City of Sioux City, Iowa v. Amerada Hess Corp.
Plaintiff: City of Sioux City, Iowa, Galva City of, Ida Grove City of, City of Galva and City of Ida Grove
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company ,individualy and doing business as ARCO products Company (f/k/a Arco Petroleum Co.), and also known as ARCO, BP Amoco Chemical Co., Chevron Texaco Corp. ,individualy and formerly known as Gulf Oil Corporation (d/b/a Chevron Products Company, d/b/a Chevron Chemical Company), Chevron USA Inc. ,individually and formerly known as Guylf Oil Corp. (d/b/a Chevron Products Company, d/b/a Chevron Chemical Company, LP, Premcor Refining Group, Inc., Sunoco Inc., Tesoro Refining and Marketing, Conoco Phillips Company individually and as successor-in-interest to Conoco Inc. and Phillips Petroleum Company doing business as Phillips 66 Company formerly known as Coastal States Trading, Inc., Marathon Oil Company, Tosco Corporation, Total Holdings USA, Inc., Atofina Petrochemicals, Inc, TMR Company, Tosco Corporation,, Unocal Corporation,, Amerada Hess Corp., Amoco Corporation, ARCO Chemical Co., ARCO, BP Amoco, Amoco Chemical Company, BP West Coast Products L.L.C., Chevron Chemical Co., Chevron Corporation, Gulf Oil Corporation (d, Guylf Oil Corp. (d, Citgo Petroleum Corp., Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Coastal Refining Marketing, Conoco Inc., ConocoPhillips, Crwon Central Petroleum Corporation, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, Equilon Enterprises, L.L.C., Equiva Trading Co., Exxonmobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corp., Exxonmobil PipeLine Company, Exxonmobil Chemical Company Inc., Exxonmobil Refining and Supply Company, Fauser Oil Co. Inc., Getty Petroleum Marketing, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Gulf Oil LP, Koch Industries Inc., Marathon Ashland Petroleum L.L.C., Marathon Oil Corp., Mobil Corporation, Mobil Oil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises, L.L.C., Phillips 66 Company, Phillips Petroleum Company, Blackstone Group LP, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc., Star Enterprise, Sun Refining & Marketing, Sun Company Inc. R & M, Texaco, Inc., Texaco Refining & Marketing (East), Inc., Texaco Refining & Marketing(East), INc., Tosco Refining Co., Unocal Corporation, Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero-Colorado Refining Company, Alon USA Energy Inc., Alon USA LP, ARCO Products Co., Coastal States Trading Inc., Diamond Shamrock Refining and Marketing Company, Fina Oil & Chemical Company, Tesoro Petro Corp., Tesoro West Coast, Total Fina Elf, Louisiana Valero Refining Company, Texas Valero Refining Company, New Jersey Valero Refining Company, Coastal States Trading, Inc., United States Steel Corporation, Mulgrew Oil Company, Premcor Inc., Tosco Refining Company, Tosco Marketing Company, Total America, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Shell Trading (US Company), Lyondell Chemical Company, Keck, Inc., BP Products North America Inc., Fina Oil and Chemical Company, American Refining Group, Inc., Ashland, Inc., Colorado Refining Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Equistar Chemicals, L.P., Exxon Mobil Corporation formally known as Exxon Corporation (and d/b/a Exxonmobil Refining and Supply Company, Exxon Chemical U.S.A. and ExxonMobil Oil Corporation), FHR/GP, LLC,, La Gloria Oil & Gas Company, Lyondell-Citgo Refining, LP, Lyondell Petrochemical GP, Inc.,, PDV Midwest Refining Co, LLC, Placid Refining Co., LLC, The Premcor Refining Group, Inc.,, Sinclair Oil Corporation, Sinclair Oil Corporatation, Texaco Refining and Marketing (East), Inc), Tosco Refining Company, and also known as Tosco Marketing Company, TPI Petroleum, Inc., Union Oil Company of California d/b/a Unocal, United Refining Company, Union Oil Comnpany of California, Valero Refining Company, Flint Hills Resources LP, Phibro Inc., Total Petrochemicals USA, Inc., Ultramar Energy Inc., Ultramar Inc., Ultramar Limited, Parker Holding Company Inc, Parker Oil Company, Leemilt's Petroleum Inc., Mercury Fuel Service, Incorporated, Hess Energy, Inc. and Getty Properties Corp.
Special Master: Ronald J. Hedges
Case Number: 1:2004cv01723
Filed: March 2, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Shira A Scheindlin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Vernon Anthony Andrew Cassin to RE-FILE Document (384 in 1:14-cv-06228-VSB-DCF, 157 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 98 in 1:10-cv-07874-SAS, 147 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 151 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 720 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 178 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 150 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 544 in 1:08-cv-00312-VSB, 93 in 1:10-cv-08184-SAS, 150 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 152 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 152 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 142 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 166 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 63 in 1:13-cv-07247-SAS, 65 in 1:13-cv-07299-SAS, 134 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 143 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 133 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 80 in 1:13-cv-07271-SAS, 138 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 803 in 1:07-cv-10470-VSB, 173 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 154 in 1:09-cv-06554-SAS, 58 in 1:13-cv-07272-SAS, 135 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 4501 in 1:00-cv-01898-VSB, 179 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 157 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 146 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 83 in 1:10-cv-08743-SAS, 143 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 153 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 118 in 1:11-cv-00479-SAS, 169 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 86 in 1:10-cv-08742-SAS, 132 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 240 in 1:14-cv-01014-VSB, 182 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 143 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 95 in 1:10-cv-08182-SAS) MOTION Motion to Remove Steven Leifer from ECF Service Lists re: (4474 in 1:00-cv-01898-VSB) Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,, .. ERROR(S): No signature or s/. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB et al.(db)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, it is hereby stipulated and agreed by the undersigned counsel that Amy E. Parker and Carlton D. Wilde, III of Bracewell LLP shall be substituted by the following as counsel of record for Defendant Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., f/k/a Atofina Petrochemicals, Inc. ("Total") in the above captioned MDL proceeding. Upon entry of this Order, Ms. Parker and Mr. Wilde shall be removed from the Court's service list, and all pleadings, notices of hearing, and other filings in the cases consolidated in this proceeding shall be served upon the aforementioned incoming counsel. Substitution of counsel will not delay the proceeding, nor will it cause prejudice to any other party. So Ordered. (Attorney Traci Leigh Lovitt for Total Petrochemicals & Refining U S A Inc, Carlton D. Wilde for Total Petrochemicals & Refining U S A Inc, Traci Leigh Lovitt for TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS AND REFINING USA, INC., Traci Leigh Lovitt for TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS AND REFINING USA, INC.,Traci Leigh Lovitt for Total Petrochemicals & Refining U S A Inc added. Attorney Amy E. Parker and Attorney Carlton D. Wilde terminated,.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/28/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB et al.(yv)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: The Court has considered the unopposed request of Petroleum Products Corporation (now known as Pyramid LLC) to admit pro hac vice Barry Goheen, Esq., Geoffrey M. Drake, Esq., and Jonathan M. Goossen, Esq., of King & Spalding LLP and the request is hereby GRANTED; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Barry Goheen, Esq., Geoffrey M. Drake, Esq., and Jonathan M. Goossen, Esq. are admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Petroleum Products Corporation (now known as Pyramid LLC) in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $600 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ama)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL BRIAN J. SULLIVAN in case 1:01-cv-00704-SAS; granting (4391) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Brian J. Sullivan as counsel of record for Defendants Cumberland Farms, Inc. and Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Brian J. Sullivan terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al. (kl)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER: The March 14, 2016 MTBE Status Conference for all cases is rescheduled for March 29, 2016 at 2:30PM. ( Status Conference set for 3/29/2016 at 02:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/3/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al., pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) Modified on 3/4/2016 (mro).
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The request of Meghan E. Judge, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action has been granted. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/23/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(kl)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting [4369 in case no. 00cv1898] MOTION for Michael Coy Connelly to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw Appearance seeking to remove M. Coy Connelly as counsel of record in the above-captioned Multi-District Litigation and all cases consolidated therein pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that CM/ECF notifications should no longer be delivered to M. Coy Connelly but instead to Amy E. Parker at amy.parker@bracewelllaw.com. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/1/2016) (kl)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL in case 1:01-cv-00704-SAS; granting (4297) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Motion for Withdrawal of Appearances of Michael Dillon and Stephen Riccardulli as counsel of record for the Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation, ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company, Exxon Company, U.S.A., Mobil Oil Corporation, Exxon Caribbean Sales Inc., Exxon Mobil Sales and Supply LLC, and Esso Standard Oil Co. (Puerto Rico) (collectively, the "ExxonMobil Defendants"), pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Stephen Joseph Riccardulli terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/3/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al. (kl)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER on WILLIE J. EPPS, JR. WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE granting 4117 Motion to Withdrawal. The request of Willie J. Epps Jr., to withdraw his appearance in the above captioned action have been granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion (Docket 4117). SO ORDERED.Motions terminated: (4117 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF) MOTION for Willie J. Epps, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma, Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P., Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ama)
October 17, 2014 Filing 134 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 10/1/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 17, 2014 Filing 133 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 10/1/2014 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2015.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #113 re rulings made during the 11/18/2013 status conference: Motions by defendants for summary judgment in the City of Fresno case, due by 1/10/2014. Responses due by 1/30/2014 Replies due by 2/14/2014. Depositions due by 12/20/2013. Discovery due by 12/20/2013. Tesoro and Kern are dismissed with prejudice for the stations at issue in the City of Fresno case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The requests of James F. Bennett, Willie J. Epps, Jr. and Selena L. Evans, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action have been granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company-California,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company-Louisiana,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy, Inc.,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy, Inc.,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy, Inc.,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy, Inc.,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy, Inc.,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corp.,James F. Bennett for Valero Mktg & Supply Co,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining & Mktg Co,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, LP,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Doe 2),,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing & Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas LP,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oaklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, LP,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining & Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company [DOE 1],James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/07/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ama)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Lauren E. Handel as counsel of record for the Exxon Mobil Corporation defendants, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court is hereby GRANTED: in case 1:03-cv-09544-SAS; granting (3732) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-04012-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05916-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05943-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-02405-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-00877-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03752-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-08360-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05960-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05903-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:05-cv-09070-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-05422-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-04009-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-04011-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-10470-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:08-cv-06306-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:09-cv-03739-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:09-cv-03738-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-01379-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-01381-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03750-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03742-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03753-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03751-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03754-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03741-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:11-cv-04072-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05496-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05924-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05925-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05927-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05928-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05930-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05931-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05932-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05959-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05958-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05957-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05956-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05933-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05963-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05962-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05961-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05919-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05917-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05915-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05914-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05913-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05937-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05920-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05921-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05922-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05938-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05923-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05939-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05901-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05940-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05902-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05941-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05905-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05906-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05942-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05907-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05911-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05912-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05945-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05946-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05947-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05948-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05949-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05950-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05951-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05952-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05953-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05954-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05955-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05926-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04974-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04973-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04969-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04971-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04972-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04970-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04975-SAS; granting [] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01719-SAS; granting [] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01718-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01721-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01722-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01723-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-03412-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-03413-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01725-SAS; granting Moti
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: This Court has considered the unopposed request of Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., and BP Corporation North America Inc. to admit pro hac vice Jeffrey J. Freeman of Kirkland & Ellis LLP, and the request is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Jeffrey J. Freeman is admitted to practice before the Court pro hac vice on behalf of the above named Defendants in these civil actions upon payment by each party of the required $200.00 to the Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/22/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ft)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 1. This Court has jurisdiction over the Parties to this Stipulation and over the subject matter of this action. The Parties to this Stipulation have advised the Court of their agreement to settle the captioned matters pursuant to a Settlement Agreement and this Stipulated Order of Dismissal. 2.The Parties to this Stipulation consent to the dismissal of the captioned actions as to the Settling Defendants only, including all claims and counterclaims, with prejudice. 3. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees., Exxonmobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corp., Mobil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Exxonmobil Chemical Company Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/3/2012) (pl)
November 30, 2012 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/22/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 26, 2012 Filing 126 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 26, 2012 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/11/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/20/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
August 10, 2012 Filing 124 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 6/7/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 10, 2012 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 6/7/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 8, 2012 Filing 122 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/2/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 8, 2012 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 5/2/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tara Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 5, 2012 Filing 120 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/24/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 5, 2012 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 2/24/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 17, 2012 Filing 116 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 17, 2012 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/15/2011 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: Benjamin L. Snowden, Esq., is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Chevron U.S.A, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a/ Shell Oil Products US), Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Texaco Inc., TMR Company (f/k/a/ Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc.), Texaco Refining and Marketing (East) Inc., and TRMI Holdings, Inc. in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $200 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ft)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: Marie S. Dennis, Esq., is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Chevron U.S.A, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Texaco Inc., TMR Company (f/k/a Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc.), Texaco Refining and Marketing (East) Inc., and TRMI Holdings, Inc. in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $200 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ft)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL in case 1:03-cv-09544-SAS granting (3401) MOTION for Anthony A. Orlandi to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. and SFPP, L.P.: The motion to withdraw the appearance of Anthony A. Orlandi as counsel of record for Defendants Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. and SFPP, L.P. is hereby granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion [Docket No. 3401]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al. (ab)
December 13, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 13, 2011 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/15/2011 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 14, 2011 Filing 111 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 14, 2011 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/15/2011 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Keena M. Hausmann dated 10/7/2011 re: Counsel for defendant writes with the consent of Mr. Rosenthal, respectfully requesting that he be relieved as counsel for defendant ConocoPhillips Company in the above referenced action. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request to relieve Mr. Rosenthal as counsel for ConocoPhilips is granted. So Ordered. (Spread to all cases as per chambers instruction) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/17/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(js)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting (3444) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw the appearances of Anthony F. King, Alec C. Zacaroli and Rebecca L Schuller as counsel pro hac vice for defendants Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC (individually and a/k/a Shell Oil Products US), Equiva Trading Company, Four Star Oil & Gas Company, Gulf Oil Corp., Motiva Enterprises LLC, TRMI Holdings, Inc., Texaco Inc., Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc., Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum, Inc., and Star Enterprise is GRANTED. Attorney Anthony Frazier King and Alec C. Zacaroli terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/17/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(mro) Modified on 8/19/2011 (mro).
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER, that Mari C. Spears, Esq., is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Chevron U.S.A, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a/ Shell Oil Products US), Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Texaco Inc., TMR Company (f/k/a/ Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc.), Texaco Refining and Marketing (East) Inc., and TRMI Holdings, Inc. in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $25.00 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/23/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(pl)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 (MEMO ENDORSEMENT) ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09544-SAS; granting (664) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas G. Campins terminated in case 1:04-cv-03417-SAS; granting (72) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas G. Campins terminated in case 1:09-cv-01419-SAS; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule lA, please withdraw the appearance of Nicholas G. Campins as counsel of record in All MDL 1358 Cases, including City of New York v. Amerada Hess Corp., et at, Case No. 04-CIV-3417; City of Pomona v, Chevron USA, Inc et ai, No, CIVMSC08-032 14; Yosemite Springs Park Utility District v. Chevron, US.A., et 01., Case No.09-CIV-1419. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted. The Clerk is directed to close this motion (docket #3410) So Ordered. Attorney Nicholas G. Campins terminated in case 1:09-cv-03738-SAS; granting (3411) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas G. Campins terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(tro)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: The motion to withdraw the appearance of Nicole L. Picard as counsel of record for Defendant Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/2/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jfe)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL, that the motion to withdraw the appearance of Anthony A. Orlandi as counsel of record for Defendant Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. in case 1:03-cv-09544-SAS; granting (3400) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony A. Orlandi terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/19/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(pl)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Daniel Alberstone for All Plaintiffs admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jfe)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Ronland K. Tellis for All Plaintiffs admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jfe)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: Attorney Mitchell McCrea for All Plaintiffs admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jfe)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: The Court has considered the unopposed request of ChevronTexaco Corporation (now known as Chevron Corporation), Chevron U.S.A. Inc., TRMI Holdings Inc., Texaco Inc., Union Oil Company of California, and Unocal Corporation, and "all predecessor companies named herein" (hereinafter "Chevron Defendants") to admit pro hac vice Sara G. Noel, Esq. of King & Spalding LLP and the request is hereby GRANTED. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/4/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(js)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #89: This Order memorializes the rulings made during the status conference held on March 30, 2011. (See ORDER as set forth) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/5/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ADMITTING FRANK A. DANTE PRO HAC VICE: It is hereby Ordered that Frank A. Dante is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Lyondell Chemical Company and Equistar Chemicals, LP in this matter. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jfe)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CASE MANAGEMENT (PLAN) ORDER: 1. Crescenta Valley Water District: A pre-motion conference for the defendants' contemplated dispositive motions is scheduled for March 11, 2011 at 4:30 pm. Defendants' pre-conference letter is due on February 25, 2011; plaintiff's reply letter is due on March 4, 2011. 2. California cases: The parties will meet and confer prior to March 11, 2011 to discuss mediation. Specifically, the parties will talk about which cases would be included in a structured settlement effort, and attempt to identify a mutually acceptable mediator. 3. The next status conference is scheduled for March 30, 2011 at 4:30 pm, subject to change. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 3/11/2011 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Status Conference set for 3/30/2011 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/18/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(db)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER, that David A. Grenardo, Esq. is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the Chevron Defendants and "all predecessor companies named herein" in this civil action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER, that Samuel D. Davis, Esq. is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the Chevron Defendants and "all predecessor companies named herein" in this civil action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: Attorney Cheryl A. Sabnis' request is GRANTED, and is permitted to appear Pro Hac Vice for ChevronTexaco Corporation (now known as Chevron Corporation), Chevron U.S.A. Inc, TRMI Boldings Inc., Texaco Inc., Union Oil Company of California. and Unocal Corporation. Attorney Cheryl A. Sabnis for Chevron Corporation,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Chevron Corporation,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Chevrontexaco Corporation,Cheryl A. Sabnis for TRMI Holdings Inc.,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Texaco Inc.,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Union Oil Company of California,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Union Oil Company of California,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Unocal Corporation admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/14/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(db)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: Attorney P. Renee Wicklund for Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., and BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/9/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: Attorney Krenice M. Roseman for Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., and BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/9/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: Attorney Andrew R. Running for Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., and BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/9/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: James J. Maher, Esq. is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the Chevron Defendants and "all predecessor companies named herein" in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $25 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/1/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jpo)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: The Court has considered the unopposed request of Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma, Valero Refining Company-Texas, L.P., Valero Refining Company-New Jersey. Valero Refining Company-Delaware, Valero Refining Company-California, Ultramar Inc. and The Premcor Refining Group Inc. (hereinafter "Valero Defendants") to admit pro hac vice Eduardo S. Perez, Amy E. Parker, and Benjamin H. Patton of Bracewell & Giuliani LLP and the request is hereby GRANTED; Eduardo S. Perez, Amy E. Parker, and Benjamin H. Patton are admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the Valero Defendants and "all predecessor companies named herein" in civil action upon the deposit of the required $25 per admission to the Clerk of this Court. Attorneys Eduardo S. Perez; Amy E. Parker; Benjamin H. Patton added. The applicants contact information is attached to this order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/20/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(db)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION Attorney Sylvia Nichole Winston for Atlantic Richfield Company,Sylvia Nichole Winston for BP Corporation North America Inc.,Sylvia Nichole Winston for BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/4/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(cd)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. Attorney Christina Lynn Henk for Atlantic Richfield Company,Christina Lynn Henk for BP Corporation North America Inc.,Christina Lynn Henk for BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/14/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(cd)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: The Court hereby approves of the withdrawal of Russell D. Workman as counsel for Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Chevron Corporation (f/k/a ChevronTexaco Corporation)( collectively, "Chevron Defendants"). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jpo)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: The Court hereby approves of the withdrawal of Russell D. Workman as counsel for Defendants Chevron USA, Inc. and Chevron Corporation (f/k/a Chevron Texaco Corporation). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jpo)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Jeremiah J. Anderson for Chevron Corporation,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Chevron Corporation,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Chevrontexaco Corporation,Jeremiah J. Anderson for TRMI Holdings Inc.,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Texaco Inc.,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Texaco Inc.,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Union Oil Company of California,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Union Oil Company of California,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Unocal Corporation admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/17/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(cd)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #79: 1. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico: Each party will choose twenty (20) focus sites for discovery. The parties shall propose the focus sites in two waves i.e., both parties will propose twelve (12) sites on one date and then both parties will propose eight (8) additional sites on a later date. The parties will meet and confer to discuss the number of trial sites and will propose an amendment to the discovery schedule in CM0 #65 to accommodate the staggered selection of focus sites. 2. Orange County Water District: A pre-motion conference for plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment is scheduled for December 16, 2010 at 2:30 pm. Plaintiffs pre-conference letter is due on December 8, 2010; defendants' reply letter is due December 13, 2010. The page limit for both letters is five (5) pages. 3. Crescenta Valley: The Hamner Institute is directed to supply plaintiffs with data from its MTBE study in Excel format. The Hamner Institute will provide plaintiff with a progress report by December 6, 2010 explaining the time frame of production and any issues that may have arisen. The Hamner Institute will also provide an affidavit from a representative from Instem concerning which data, if any, it was unable to export. 4. New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection: A. Parties will submit a proposed CMO governing discovery, experts, pre-trial, and trial matters by February 28, 20ll. B. Defendants will be permitted to take up to eighteen (18) depositions of NJDEP case managers for defense focus sites in anticipation of trial site selection. These depositions will be limited to seven (7) hours in duration, and will take place in Trenton, New Jersey. C. Defendants are directed to provide plaintiffs with a revised list of possible topics for the proposed deposition of a witness from the Office of Natural Resource Restoration. If the parties still cannot agree, they are referred to Special Master Warner to resolve the dispute. D. The parties are directed to disclose the criteria they used to identify the receptors impacted by release sites by December 6, 2010. E. By December 13, 2010, plaintiffs will provide defendants with the number of private wells on each street that plaintiffs have identified as impacted by plaintiffs' release sites. F. The parties are directed to exchange proposed keywords for the search of case managers' emails by December 2, 2010; to meet and confer regarding the proposed keywords by December 8, 2010; and any dispute over the keywords is referred to Special Master Warner, to be resolved by December 15, 2010. Plaintiffs will then propose a schedule for production of case manager emails to defendants by December 20,2010. G. The parties are each directed to select their ten (10) trial sites by February 1, 2011. H. Defendants are directed to submit, by December 6, 2010, a list of ten (10) individuals whose hard drives they propose to search for the purpose of sampling. 5. Village of Bethalto, Town of Kouts, Coraopolis: Plaintiffs shall have until December 31, 2010 to file amended complaints. Defendants will have thirty (30) days after the amended complaints are filed to file a motion to dismiss or to answer. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2010. Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/16/2010 at 02:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/1/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(db)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #79, This Order memorializes the rulings made during the status conference held on November 23, 2010. 1. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico: Each party will choose twenty (20) focus sites for discovery. The parties shall propose the focus sites in two waves i.e., both parties will propose twelve (12) sites on one date and then both parties will propose eight (8) additional sites on a later date. The parties will meet and confer to discuss the number of trial sites and will propose an amendment to the discovery schedule in CM0 #65 to accommodate the staggered selection of focus sites. 2. Orange County Water District: A pre-motion conference for plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment is scheduled for December 16, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. Plaintiffs pre-conference letter is due on December 8, 2010; defendants' reply letter is due December 13, 2010. The page limit for both letters is five (5) pages. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/1/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(pl)
October 20, 2010 Filing 81 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lesley K Lawrence-Hammer on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Coastal Oil New England, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. New Address: Greenberg Traurig LLP, 2101 L Street, NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, USA 20037, 202-331-3100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
October 19, 2010 Filing 80 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lesley K Lawrence-Hammer on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Coastal Oil New England, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. New Address: Greenberg Traurig LLP, 2101 L Street, NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, USA 20037, 202-331-3100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
October 19, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lesley K Lawrence-Hammer on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Coastal Oil New England, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. New Address: Greenberg Traurig LLP, 2101 L Street, NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, USA 20037, 202-331-3100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
October 19, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lesley K Lawrence-Hammer on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Coastal Oil New England, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. New Address: Greenberg Traurig LLP, 2101 L Street, NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, USA 20037, 202-331-3100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION; Upon the motion of Christine M. Riley and said sponsor attorney's affidavit in support; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Michelle A. Burr is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Southern Counties Oil Company, Inc., in the above captioned Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(djc) Modified on 8/9/2010 (djc).
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #75: For each case currently pending in MDL 1358, those defendants who remain a party and who owned or leased property with underground storage tanks (USTs) or owned or leased USTs during the relevant time period and in the relevant geographic area at issue (as defined by the Court) shall provide declarations in that case identifying such property and underground storage tanks they owned or leased, and the dates of such ownership or leasing, within the relevant geographic area. If a defendant owns or owned, or leases or leased more than 50 USTs or properties with USTs, such defendant may provide a printout from a database or other electronically available information together with a declaration describing the meaning of the printout. If a defendant would have to review numerous paper files or otherwise has data gaps based on the age of the information, the defendant may seek relief based on burden from theSpecial Master. For those cases where the use of "focus sites" has been ordered by the Court, a defendant shall provide a declaration regarding ownership and leasing information for properties and USTs for the focus sites that have been or will be selected in the case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/22/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(db)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #72 This Order memorializes the rulings made during the status conference held on 5/19/10. ExxomMobil is granted leave to notice de bene esse depositions of three ExxonMobil employees-Mr. Robert Biles, Mr. Vic Dugan, and Mr. Thomas Eizember-in all cases in this multi-district litigation, and as further set forth in this document. The next all-cases status conference is scheduled for 9/8/10 at 10:30. Status Conference set for 9/8/2010 at 10:30 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/27/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Alec C. Zacaroli,Esq., is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Chevron U.S.A, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Texaco Inc., TMR Company (f/k/a Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc.), Texaco Refining and Marketing (East) Inc., and TRMI Holdings, Inc. in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $25.00 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/26/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(rjm)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #65: re discovery rulings made during the status conference held on 4/14/10 as to The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and New Jersey cases, see document. All Cases Status Conference set for 5/19/2010 at 10:30 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL that John J. Amberg is no longer associated with Kirkland & Ellis LLP and should be removed from the service list. Kirkland & Ellis LLP continues to serve as counsel for the BP Defendants through their attorney(s) J. Andrew Langan, Wendy L. Bloom, Peter Bellacosa and Christopher Esbrook and all future correspondence and papers in this action should continue to be directed to them. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/12/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #62: In the above-captioned multi-litigation, a large number of cases in which all claims have been dismissed, either by court order or pursuant to settlement, have never been officially closed and removed from the docket. Upon review of chamber's records, and consultation with liason counsel in this matter, the Court has determined that the following cases should not remain open. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the listed cases. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/25/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY David T. Ritter PRO HAC VICE for all plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/24/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #60: re rulings made at the 3/4/10 status conference, see document for various deadlines..... In Incorporated Village of Mineola, West Hempstead Water District, Carle Place Water District, Town of Southhampton, Village of Hempstead, Town of East Hampton, Westbury Water District: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2010. Motion for summary judgment by defendant Barco in the West Hempstead case, due by 4/15/2010. Responses due by 5/13/2010 Replies due by 5/27/2010. Discovery due by 10/1/2010. All-cases Status Conference set for 4/14/2010 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/9/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #57: 1. Village ofHempstead and West Hempstead: A. A conference is scheduled for February 10, 2010 at lOAM to discuss preparation for the West Hempstead trial scheduled to begin on June 21, 2010. This conference may be converted to an "all cases" status conference if the parties identify a sufficient number of issues that should be decided by the Court.B. Plaintiffs are directed to supply defendants with the "Village of Hempstead spill documents" requested by defendants. If defendants are not satisfied with the documents produced, they may identify what documents they believe are missing to Special Master Warner. C. Plaintiffs are directed to supply defendants with the Bates numbers ofthe "West Hempstead Analyte Data and Laboratory Procedures" documents requested by defendants. 2. New Jersey:A. Plaintiffs are directed to produce the "Oracle" database in native format. If the parties cannot resolve the other electronic discovery disputes in this case, including whether portions of the "Oracle" database should be redacted, with ten (10) days, these disputes are referred to Special Master Warner.B. Plaintiffs are directed to produce the non-site-specific discovery requested by defendants. If plaintiffs object to any of these requests as being overbroad, the matter is referred to Special Master Warner. C. Plaintiffs are directed to produce a list of sites for which they have not identified specific MTBE release points. If defendants, with plaintiffs' direction, are unable to extract the other sites at issue in this case - i.e., those sites where specific lVITBE release points have been identified - from the databases already produced by plaintiffs, the parties are directed to meet with Special Master Warner to determine how to proceed with extracting a list ofMTBE release sites. D. The parties are directed to meet and confer to discuss ajoint proposedcase management order for the selection of focus sites. If the parties cannot agree upon ajoint proposal, they shall submit individual proposed case management orders. The parties shall not limit the selection of focus sites to a single county or geographic region and shall not use a "strike" process in selecting focus sites. In addition, the parties shall not sequence the proposal of focus sites between parties, but shall propose focus sites in two waves - e.g., both parties will propose eight (8) sites on one date and then both parties will propose four (4) additional sites on a later date. The parties mayselect a larger number of focus sites for discovery than for trial. The number of discovery sites shall be no greater than fifty (50), and the number of trial sites shall be no greater than twenty (20). E. Defendants shall be given limited discovery on the entire set of sites at issue in this case. The discovery should be aimed at providing defendants with the information needed to select focus sites for trial. The parties shall meet with Special Master Warner to determine the scope of this limited discovery. F. Plaintiffs are directed to provide short interrogatories to defendants requesting information regarding the refineries from which each defendant has shipped gasoline products into the State ofNew Jersey, the terminals that each defendant has used in doing so, the stations that each defendant owned in New Jersey, the underground storagetanks used at those stations, and the periods of time during whichdefendants had ownership of each one of those stations. Each defendant shall answer these interrogatories separately and retains the right to make objections as appropriate. F. The time for asserting third party claims is stayed. A deadline for asserting third party claims relating to focus sites will be set after those sites are chosen. As to all other sites, the time for asserting third party claims is stayed indefinitely. 2. Puerto Rico: A. Plaintiffs are directed to produce a list of sites for which they have notidentified specific MTBE release points. If defendants, with plaintiffs' direction, are unable to extract the other sites at issue in this case - i.e., those sites where specific MTBE release points have been identified - from the databases already produced by plaintiffs, the parties are directed to meet with Special Master Wan1er to determine how to proceed with extracting a list of MTBE release sites. B. The parties shall inform the Court of their progress following the parties' scheduled visit to Puerto Rico on January 14 and 15.C. The parties are directed to be ready to discuss the process of choosing focus sites for trial by the next status conference. The parties shouldlook to the Court's rulings in the New Jersty case for guidance on how to proceed with discovery and the selection of focus sites. 3. Exxon Mobil shall be permitted to take de bene esse fact depositions of Mr. Robert Reynolds, Mr. Robert Scala, and Mr. Sullivan D. Curran. Mr. Reynolds is already scheduled to be deposed in the Napoli Bern cases. Unless that deposition is cancelled, Exxon Mobil shall be permitted to take its deposition of Mr. Reynolds following the deposition relating to the Napoli Bern cases. 4. In the Napoli Bern cases, the defendants are directed to inform plaintiffs by January 11, 2010 which scheduled expert depositions, if any, they are waiving. 5. Tampa Bay Water, City ofCrystal River, City ofInverness Water District, and City of Homosassa: Plaintiffs are directed, no later than January 15, 2010, to serve interrogatories and/or document requests on Gulf Oil Limited Partnership ("GOLP") in anticipation of GOLP filing a motion for summary judgment in these cases. Defendants shall either respond to these requests or explain to Special Master Warner why the requested documents do not exist. After any such issues are settled, GOLP shall submit a proposed schedule for briefing its summary judgment motion. 6. Riverhead Water District case: Plaintiff is directed to amend its interrogatory responses as directed at the status conference by January 20, 2010. 7. Town ofSouthampton: Plaintiff was directed to amend its interrogatory responses by January 8, 2010. 8. Orange County Water District: the parties are directed to select the ten (10) focus plumes that will be used for trial. The parties shall exchange their lists of five (5) focus plumes by January 15, 2010. The parties are directed to complete fact discovery by the end of August, and to submit a proposed expert discovery schedule for approval by the Court. Status Conference set for 2/10/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/14/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(db)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #55, this Order memorializes the rulings made during the status conference held on 10/29/09, see document as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/4/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Nicole L. Picard for Gulf Oil Limited Partnership admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
October 23, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (12 in 1:09-cv-03739-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 75 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 207 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 91 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 81 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 74 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 91 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 101 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 99 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 91 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 89 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 87 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 88 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 90 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 110 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 47 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 98 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 121 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 49 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 53 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 50 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 41 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 103 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 45 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 68 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 79 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 58 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 41 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 52 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 87 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 74 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 54 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 490 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 92 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 41 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 17 in 1:09-cv-03738-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 49 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 40 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 2867 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 47 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 22 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 103 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 119 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 6 in 1:09-cv-06554-SAS, 72 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 290 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 50 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 90 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 54 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 97 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 70 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 90 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 55 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 257 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 109 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 49 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 103 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 105 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 85 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 108 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 92 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Anthony A. Orlandi for Getty Oil Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/1/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jpo)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Anthony A. Orlandi for Gulf Limited Liability Partnership, Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, Gulf Limited Liability Partnership, Gulf Oil, Limited Partnership, and Gulf Oil Limited Partnership admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/25/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
September 25, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (37 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 85 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 88 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 473 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 50 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 47 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 48 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 117 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 70 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 79 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 89 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 43 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 101 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 10 in 1:09-cv-03739-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 51 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 101 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 39 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 54 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 38 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 86 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 107 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 87 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 103 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 108 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 4 in 1:09-cv-06554-SAS, 2847 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 38 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 52 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 47 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 89 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 68 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 96 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 203 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 106 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 66 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 45 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 88 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 47 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 53 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 90 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 73 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 85 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 99 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 253 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 88 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 288 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 48 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 90 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 54 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 97 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 36 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 95 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 80 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 15 in 1:09-cv-03738-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 89 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 51 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 101 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 118 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 20 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 83 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS AGAINST GULF OIL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP: Pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Plaintiffs and Defendant Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, hereby request that the Court enter this voluntary dismissal with prejudice of all claims against Gulf Oil Limited Partnership as set forth in Plaintiffs Seventh Amended Complaint, filed on October 26, 2006. The Parties agree to the dismissal and further agree that such dismissal is with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff reserves all other rights as against all other defendants. Gulf Oil LP and Gulf Oil Limited Partnership terminated. Gulf Oil LP terminated. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/25/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:04-cv-01723-SAS(db)
July 27, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL that Khara Coleman is no longer associated with Kirkland & Ellis LLP and should be removed from the service list. Kirkland & Ellis LLP continues to serve as counsel for the BP Defendants... (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 41: This Court has jurisdiction over the Parties to this Stipulation and over the subject matter of this action. The Parties to this Stipulation have advised the Court of their agreement to settle this matter pursuant to a Settlement Agreement, a Release, and this Stipulated Order of Dismissal. The Parties to this Stipulation consent to the dismissal of this action as to the Lyondell Defendants only, including all claims and counterclaims, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:04-cv-01723-SAS(tro)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER....Therefore, the parties have requested-and consented to the appointment of a special discovery master. Accordingly, I am appointing, pursuant to FRCP 53(a)(1)(A) and (a)(1)(C) (as amended effective 12/1/03), after giving the parties notice and an opportunity to be heard (including the opportunity to recommend candidates), Ronald J. Hedges, Esq to serve as Special Master, until further order of this Court...The Special master's appointment is therefore effective immediately. The Special Master is directed "to proceed with all reasonable diligence" in the performance of his duties, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/8/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
June 17, 2009 Filing 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Equistar Chemicals, L.P.,, Lyondell Chemical Company,, Lyondell Chemical Company, Equistar Chemicals, L.P., Lyondell Chemical Company, Equistar Chemicals, LP, Lyondell Chemical Company,, Equistar Chemicals, LP, Lyondell Chemical Co., Lyondell Chemical Co., Equistar Chemicals L.P., Lyondell Chemical Co., Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Co., Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals, LP, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company,, Lydondell Chemical Company, Equistar Chemicals,L.P., Lyondell Ccemical Company, Equistar Chemicals, L.P., Lyondell Chemical Company, Equistar Chemicals LP, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company. Responses due by 7/1/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Hoffman, Alan)
April 28, 2009 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #59 Notice of Appearance. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kkc)
April 28, 2009 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #60 Notice of Appearance. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kkc)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. Attorney Keara L. Kelley for El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, El Paso Merchant Energey-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Piont Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Piont Oil Company and El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Grace Leigh Chan for El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, El Paso Merchant Energey-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Piont Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Piont Oil Company and El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 27, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (61 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 87 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 238 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 100 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 48 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 100 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 49 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 39 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 39 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 64 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 277 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 83 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 87 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 4 in 1:09-cv-03738-SAS, 58 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 16 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 34 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 95 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 109 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 83 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 103 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 43 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 81 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 39 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 2337 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 97 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 37 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 79 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 83 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 41 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 44 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 67 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 4 in 1:09-cv-03739-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 42 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 118 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 192 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 52 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 42 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 97 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 95 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 84 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 97 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 78 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 43 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 81 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 80 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 65 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 81 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 76 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 79 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 35 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 60 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 41 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 27, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (35 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 40 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 49 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 59 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 44 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 101 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 68 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 83 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 42 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 43 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 101 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 80 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 81 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 40 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 96 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 193 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 61 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 98 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 84 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 40 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 50 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 36 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 278 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 5 in 1:09-cv-03738-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 2338 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 35 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 76 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 65 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 35 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 96 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 44 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 66 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 98 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 119 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 88 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 104 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 85 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 84 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 239 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 84 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 36 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 80 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 110 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 36 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 5 in 1:09-cv-03739-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 43 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 98 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 38 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 83 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 83 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 42 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 88 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 79 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for defendants El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company and Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company in the above captioned case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(mme)
April 27, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (32 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 36 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 99 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 66 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 64 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 38 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 38 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 3 in 1:09-cv-03738-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 40 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 41 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 41 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 86 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 99 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 94 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 102 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 2330 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 62 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 79 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 43 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 3 in 1:09-cv-03739-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 80 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 83 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 78 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 42 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 40 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 113 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 237 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 78 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 81 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 81 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 31 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(mme)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #52: In the New Jersey case, plaintiff shall identify, not later than 4/10/09, every discovery request to which it objects on the ground that the request call for site-specific discovery. If the parties are unable to resolve any dispute, they may bring the matter to this Court for resolution. Plaintiff shall provide non-site specific discovery by 5/15/09. In the City of NY case, the City shall respond to Shell's motion to exclude punitive damages by 4/30/09 and Shell shall reply by 5/11/09....This court will hold a hearing in the City of NY case on 4/24/09 at 10:30 am and in the Orange County Water District case on 5/15/09 at 11 am....In the recently filed Oyster Bay and Garden City case, defendants' unopposed motion for this Court to decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims is granted. Defendants shall submit proposed Order reflecting this ruling. When necessary, the parties shall contact this Court to schedule the next omnibus status conference. Response due by 4/30/2009. Reply due by 5/11/2009. Oral Argument/hearing set for 4/24/2009 at 10:30 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/17/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF DELIRIS ORTIZ-TORRES: It is hereby ordered that Deliris Ortiz-Torres, Esq, is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation and Atlantic Trading Marketing, Inc. (formerly known as Total Oil, Inc.) in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $25 fee to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/2/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jpo)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the following motions on the master docket for MDL 1358, No. 00civ.1898 #2090, 2092, 2155, 2185. terminating (73) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:03-cv-09544-SAS; terminating (78) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:03-cv-09543-SAS; terminating (41) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01727-SAS; terminating (40) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01726-SAS; terminating (56) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01718-SAS; terminating (62) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01719-SAS; terminating (65) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01720-SAS; terminating (65) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01725-SAS; terminating (61) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01721-SAS; terminating (43) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02068-SAS; terminating (43) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02072-SAS; terminating (87) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02389-SAS; terminating (59) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02390-SAS; terminating (60) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02388-SAS; terminating (34) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-03415-SAS; terminating (41) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-03416-SAS; terminating (36) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-03419-SAS; terminating (39) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-05421-SAS; terminating (41) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-05422-SAS; terminating (40) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-05423-SAS; terminating (254) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-05424-SAS; terminating (47) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-06993-SAS; terminating (21) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:05-cv-04018-SAS; terminating (21) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:05-cv-09070-SAS; terminating (20) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:06-cv-01381-SAS; terminating (22) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:06-cv-03741-SAS; terminating (2090) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; terminating (2092) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (2155) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/20/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER TO AMEND, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to amend the caption of the order in In Re Methyl Tertiary Butyl Ether Products Liability Litigation, No. 00-1898, which was entered on 3/16/09 (document no. 2299), to read as follows: "CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #51" (change in italics) re: (50 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 78 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 61 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 91 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 76 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 75 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 91 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 42 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 54 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 97 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 103 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 81 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 89 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 52 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 36 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 76 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 32 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 37 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 42 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 35 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 76 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 40 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 214 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 94 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 29 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 33 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 54 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 91 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 36 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 10 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 58 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 186 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 76 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 43 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 33 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 89 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 35 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 73 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 2299 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 74 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 37 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 75 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 29 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 29 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 94 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 59 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 31 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 81 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 271 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 50 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 28 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS) Case Management Plan,,, (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/17/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #48 re rulings made during the status conference held on 2/26/09: In the New Jersey and Puerto Rico cases, the parties shall meet and confer in order to submit a joint pre-trial scheduling order at the next status conference. In the City of NY case, the City seeks an order from this Court finding a limited waiver of Shell's assertion of attorney-client privilege with respect to certain documents identified on its privilege logs, and as further set forth in this document.....The next status conference is scheduled for 4/2/09 at 10 am. Status Conference set for 4/2/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/16/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Khara A. A. Coleman for Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Products North Americas, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Products North Americas, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Co., BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, individually, BP Corporation North America Inc,, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North Americas, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, Atlantic Richfield Company, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield CO., BP Corporation North America, Inc.(individually and f/k/a BP Amoco Corporation), BP Products North America, Inc.,, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Co., BP Corporation North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, Atlantic Richfeild Company, BP Products North America, Inc,, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company and BP Products North America, Inc., Christopher J. Esbrook for Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Products North Americas, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Company North America, Inc., BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Products North Americas, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Co., BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, individually, BP Corporation North America Inc,, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North Americas, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, Atlantic Richfield Company, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield CO., BP Corporation North America, Inc.(individually and f/k/a BP Amoco Corporation), BP Products North America, Inc.,, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Co., BP Corporation North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, Atlantic Richfeild Company, BP Products North America, Inc,, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company and BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/16/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jeh)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSIONS OF Khara A. A. Coleman and Christopher J. Esbrook for defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., and BP Corporation North America Inc.. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/10/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 10, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (74 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 29 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 54 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 35 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 73 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 184 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 87 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 31 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 33 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 31 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 212 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 72 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 89 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 31 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 27 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 38 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 56 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 36 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 87 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 48 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 31 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 71 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 92 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 6 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 31 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 74 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 92 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 95 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 59 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 54 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 73 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 35 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 76 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 74 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 52 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 89 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 31 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 74 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 41 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 79 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 269 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 26 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 89 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 33 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 50 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 31 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 28 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 2291 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 101 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 40 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 79 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 34 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER the Clerk of Court is directed to close the following motions on the master docket for MDL 1358, No. 00-1898: #1841, 1971, 1976, 1981, 1984, 1986, 1988, 1990, 1992, 2056, 2057, 2078, 2067, 2078, 2100, 2109, 2127, and 2200. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/6/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE that Debra S. Rosen, is hereby admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice of Archer & Greiner, PC to represent third-party witness Leggett, Brashears & Graham in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $25.00 fee per applicant to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/25/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
February 25, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (52 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 181 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 37 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 31 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 33 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 32 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 25 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 27 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 85 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 71 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 37 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 90 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 267 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 29 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 25 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 52 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 29 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 53 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 93 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 33 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 38 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 29 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 37 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 31 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 36 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 71 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 31 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 45 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 22 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 70 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 72 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 42 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 54 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 90 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 74 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 85 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 29 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 87 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 71 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 87 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 57 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 209 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 29 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 38 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 2274 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 49 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 29 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 32 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 24 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 99 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 74 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 87 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 72 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 37 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 29 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 4 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 69 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
February 23, 2009 Filing 46 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #48: re rulings of the 1/15/09 status conference. In the City of NY case, the City will select 200 log entries from Shell's Phase 2 attorney-client privilege logs. In all cases in which either Lyondell or Equistar is a defendant, the parties may submit briefing on (a) whether these defendants, who recently filed suggestions of bankruptcy, are immune to suit in light of the automatic bankruptcy stay and (b) whether the district court has jurisdiction to resolve this issue. On the jurisdictional issue, the parties shall file simultaneous briefs by 1/30/09, and responses by 2/16/09. On the merits issue, the plaintiffs shall submit moving papers by 2/6/09, the defendants shall respond by 2/27/09, and the plaintiffs' reply is due by 3/6/09....The next status conference is scheduled for 2/26/09 at 4:30 pm. Motion due by 2/6/2009. Response due by 2/27/2009. Reply due by 3/6/2009. Status Conference set for 2/26/2009 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
February 20, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Grace Leigh Chan on behalf of El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energey-Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Piont Oil Company Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Chan, Grace)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Daniel A. Eisenberg for Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco Inc R & M, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco Inc,, Sunoco Inc R & M, Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R & M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), SFPP, L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco, Inc. and Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) admitted Pro Hac Vice, upon the deposit of the required $25 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/19/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
February 19, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (21 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 87 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 178 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 22 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 26 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 74 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 264 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 19 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 30 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 84 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 69 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 34 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 28 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 87 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 52 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 34 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 28 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 36 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 29 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 30 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 54 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 33 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 2271 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 68 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 84 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 21 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 26 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 42 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 29 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 28 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 74 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 66 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 68 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 50 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 96 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 84 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 90 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 22 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 35 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 54 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 35 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 24 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 29 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 67 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 34 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 34 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 206 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 68 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 69 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 31 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 22 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 45 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 22 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 20 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,,,,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
January 31, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (6 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 9 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 9 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 10 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 52 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 37 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 11 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 17 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 24 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 17 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 9 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 67 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 24 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 9 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 3 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 68 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 24 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 26 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 50 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 4 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 26 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 51 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 31 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 20 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 12 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 17 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 1963 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 7 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 37 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 63 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 16 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 26 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 52 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 33 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 19 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 31 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 33 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 7 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 51 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 36 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 18 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 68 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 50 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 11 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 51 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 9 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 9 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 9 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 9 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 6 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 53 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 244 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 18 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 77 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 31 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 12 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 9 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jpo)
January 31, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (5 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 23 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 52 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 76 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 11 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 67 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 17 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 25 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 51 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 11 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 25 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 8 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 2 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 50 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 32 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 16 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 35 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 62 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 6 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 76 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 8 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 23 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 8 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 5 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 8 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 16 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 9 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 8 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 5 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 10 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 19 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 26 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 3 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 50 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 25 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 50 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 66 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 26 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 54 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 18 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 45 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 8 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 49 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 8 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 8 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 49 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 36 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 23 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 8 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 36 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 26 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 16 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 15 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 17 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 67 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 243 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 10 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 42 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 26 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 54 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 1962 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 5 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 32 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jpo)
January 23, 2009 Filing 43 AMENDED ANSWER to (1 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS) Complaint,,,,,,, (1 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS) Complaint,,,,,, (1 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS) Complaint,,,,,, (1 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS) Complaint,,,,,,, (1 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS) Complaint,,,,,, (1 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS) Complaint,,,,,, (1 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS) Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Huntsman Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Edwards, Sarah)
January 13, 2009 Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #46: In the City of NY case, employees of the parties who will testify as experts must be disclosed at the same time as other experts. If the employees are not retained under Rule 26, they do not need to furnish an expert report. In the Orange County case, the three plumes that plaintiffs dismissed from defendants' selection of ten focus plumes are dismissed without prejudice because the claims relating to those plumes are not ripe. Plaintiffs will not dismiss all claims relating to the seven remaining plumes on defendants' list. Defendants will select three more focus plumes by 12/19/08 and plaintiffs will inform defendants by 1/7/09 whether plaintiffs' claims relating to the selected plumes are ripe. In the New Jersey case, the parties will provide discovery of all readily available electronic data by 2/6/09, including all electronically stored site file information. Because no "focus plumes" have been selected, this discovery is statewide. Plaintiffs may not redact information in the site files relating to tests for other contaminants. The next status conference is scheduled for 1/15/09 at 10:30 am. The following status conference is scheduled for 2/26/09 at 4:30 pm. Status Conference set for 2/26/2009 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/13/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
January 9, 2009 Filing 41 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Lyondell Chemical Company and Equistar Chemicals, LP. Document filed by Equistar Chemicals, L.P.,, Lyondell Chemical Company,, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Equistar Chemicals, LP, Lyondell Chemical Company,, Equistar Chemicals, LP, Equistar Chemicals, L.P., Lyondell Chemical Co., Lyondell Chemical Co., Equistar Chemicals L.P., Lyondell Chemical Co., Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Co., Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals, LP, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Corporation, 7-Eleven, Inc.,, Equistar Chemicals,L.P., Lyondell Ccemical Company, Equistar Chemicals, L.P., Lyondell Chemical Company, Equistar Chemicals LP, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Equistar Chemicals, LP, Lynondell Chemical CompanyAssociated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Paz, Inbal)
December 2, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (40 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 22 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 42 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 22 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 22 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 45 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 82 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 258 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 25 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 40 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 76 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 19 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 18 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 24 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 19 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 42 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 48 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 22 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 77 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 76 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 32 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 2170 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 17 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 79 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 19 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 44 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 22 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 40 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 31 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 24 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 65 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 154 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 40 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 19 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 31 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 45 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 38 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 16 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 20 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 22 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 34 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 64 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 40 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 45 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 21 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 36 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 25 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 22 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 63 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 76 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 19 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 62 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 64 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 150 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 63 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 64 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 91 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 22 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 19 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,,,,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(db)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered the unopposed request of Defendants Koch Industries, Inc. and Flint Hills Resources, LP to admit pro hac vice William P. Childress of Hunton & Williams LLP, and the request is hereby GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that William P. Childress is admitted to practice before the Court pro hac vice on behalf of the above-named Defendants in these civil actions upon payment of the required $25.00 fee to the Clerk of the Court. Attorney William P. Childress for Koch Industries, Inc., Flint Hills Resources LP, Koch Industries, Inc., Fint Hills Resources, Koch Industries, Inc., Flint Hills Resources LP, Koch Industries, Inc., Flint Hills Resources LP, Koch Industries, Inc., Flint Hills Resources LP, Koch Industries, Inc., Flint Hills Resources LP, Koch Industries Inc., Flint Hills Resources, LP, Koch Industries Inc., Koch Industries, Inc, Koch Industries, Inc., Flint Hills Resources, LP, Koch Industries, Inc., Flint Hilss Resources, Flint Hills Resources LP, Koch Industries Inc., Flint Hills Resources, LP, Koch Industries Inc., Koch Industries, Inc., Flint Hills Resources, LP, Koch Industries, Inc. and Flint Hills Resources, LP admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/1/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(db)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: This Court has considered the unopposed request of Defendants Koch Industries, Inc. and Flint Hills Resources, LP to admit pro hac vice William P. Childress of Hunton & Williams LLP, and the request is hereby GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that William P. Childress is admitted to practice before the Court pro hac vice on behalf of the above-named Defendants in these civil actions upon payment of the required $25.00 fee to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/1/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(tro)
December 2, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (16 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 31 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 24 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 19 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 63 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 35 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 78 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 75 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 81 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 40 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 20 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 17 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 18 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 62 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 15 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 18 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 63 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 42 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 75 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 18 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 33 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 42 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 2169 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 81 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 62 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 153 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 64 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 42 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 21 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 21 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 257 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 75 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 61 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 39 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 149 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 76 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 63 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 37 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 54 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 23 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 24 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 23 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 40 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 30 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 38 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 18 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 21 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 76 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 90 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 40 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 43 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 25 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 21 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 17 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 16 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(tro)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: With respect to the New Jersey and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico cases, the parties will attempt to agree upon, and submit, pre-trial schedules by the next status conference. For new focus cases, plaintiffs have selected American Water of New Jersey and defendants have selected Village of Sands Point, New York. The parties in both cases shall meet and confer to submit pre-trial schedules for these cases by the next status conference, with trial dates in each on June 29, 2009. In the newly filed TSCA cases, if the defendants wish to file a motion to dismiss the non-TSCA claims and the non-TSCA defendants, they shall do so by November 21,2008. Plaintiffs shall reply by December 19,2008 and defendants shall reply by January 5, 2009.The next status conference is scheduled for December 11,2008 at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED Replies due by 1/5/2009. Status Conference set for 12/11/2008 at 02:00 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/1/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jmi)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that the Clerk of Court is directed to convert all open member cases of MDL 1358, 00-1898, into ECF cases. This includes the following cases and any that is made part of MDL 1358 in the future, as listed further in this document. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/26/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that with consent of both the City of New York and the Shell Defendants, the Court hereby ORDERS that the request by the Shell Defendants for relief from the deadlines in CMO 26 be referred to Special Master Warner pursuant to FRCP 72(a) for disposition in the course of resolving the City's motion to compel. Special Master Warner is hereby authorized to consider the Shell Defendants' request on its merits. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/19/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, Wallace King Domike & Reiskin PLLC and King & Spalding LLP, current counsel of record for defendant Huntsman Petrochemical Corporation, seek an order for substitution of counsel. Huntsman Petrochemical Corporation is currently represented by Richard E. Wallace, Jr., William F. Hughes, and Rebecca L. Schuller of Wallace Domike &Reiskin PLLC, and Robert E. Meadows and Charles C. Correll, Jr. of King & Spalding L.L.P. Huntsman Petrochemical Corporation has consented to representation by Alan L. Sullivan and Amber M. Mettler, of Snell & Wilmer LLP, and John C. Ertman and Mark A. Greenwood, of Ropes & Gray LLP. Alan L. Sullivan and Amber M. Mettler, of Snell & Wilmer LLP, and John C. Ertman and Mark A. Greenwood, of Ropes & Gray LLP, have accepted representation of Huntsman Petrochemical Corporation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/10/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jmi)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE Alan L. Sullivan and Amber M. Mettler for Defendant Huntsman Petrochemical Corporation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/10/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jmi)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER the motion to withdraw the appearances of John McGahren, Esquire and Daniel Mulvihill, Esquire, of Patton Boggs, LLP, on behalf of Defendants Getty Properties Corp. and Leemilt's Petroleum Inc., in the above-captioned matters is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that John C. McMeekin II, Esquire, of Rawle & Henderson, LLP, is hereby substituted as counsel for Defendants Getty Properties Corp. and Leemilt's Petroleum Inc., in the above-captioned matters. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/10/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jmi)
October 30, 2008 Filing 32 AMENDED ANSWER to (1238 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF) Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Gulf Oil LP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Garvey, Christopher)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Case Management Order #39, dated 10/27/08, should have been numbered 40 instead of 39. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the 10/27/08 Case Management Order #39 (Document #2077) so that it is entitled Case Management Order #40. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/29/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(tro)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #40: In the City of NY case, the trial will begin on 6/22/09. Defendants in the City of NY case will provide plaintiffs with updated site information from the two identified Shell stations by 10/10/08. Plaintiffs, in turn, will state by 10/23/08, whether each of the seven "potentially threatened wells" listed in their interrogatory response is threatened or not.....The next status conference is scheduled for 10/30/08 at 10:00 am. Status Conference set for 10/30/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/27/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd) Modified on 10/31/2008 (mro).
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE that this action, including, all claims, counterclaims, and cross-claims of any kind, is hereby dismissed with prejudice only as those Settling Defendants....identified on the attached Exhibit A, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/17/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:04-cv-01723-SAS(cd)
September 12, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (6 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 31 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 7 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 19 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 53 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 78 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 11 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 31 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 10 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 31 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 54 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 7 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 64 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 12 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 10 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 25 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 34 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 13 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 10 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 8 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 38 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 8 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 10 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 34 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 69 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 13 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 52 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 45 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 10 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 1969 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 6 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 24 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 19 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 51 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 52 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 12 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 78 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 18 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 10 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 37 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 30 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 51 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 5 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 32 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 10 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 18 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 18 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 52 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 25 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 245 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 68 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 18 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 4 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 32 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 25 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 32 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 38 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 10 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 69 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 17 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 52 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 20 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 10 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 8 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 6 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(tro)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF ELAINE M. MALDONADO-MATIAS: Maldonado-Matias is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation and Total Oil, Inc. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/12/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(tro)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF JUAN A. MARQUES-DIAZ: It is hereby ordered that Juan A. Marques-Diaz, is admitted to practice pro hac vice in this action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/22/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jpo)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION JAN CARLOS RODRIGUEZ-MUNOZ: It is hereby ordered that Jan Carlos Rodriguez-Munoz, is admitted to practice pro hac vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/22/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jpo)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2), as to defendants Fauser Oil Co., Keck, Inc., and Mulgrew Oil Co., without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/4/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:04-cv-01723-SAS(cd)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. Eduardo S. Perez, Amy E. Parker, and Julie K. Huff are hereby admitted to practice before the Court pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Total Petrochemicals USA, Inc. in these civil actions upon the deposit of the required $25.00 fee per applicant to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/5/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(tro)
February 5, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (49 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 22 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 31 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 49 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 51 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 2 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 25 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 10 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 65 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 15 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 12 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 61 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 26 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 15 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 22 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 44 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 42 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 25 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 34 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 3 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 6 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 16 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 17 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 8 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 22 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 24 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 14 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 31 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 155 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 47 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 25 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 25 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 6 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 5 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 33 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 52 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 1692 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 4 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 5 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 35 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 9 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 6 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 37 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 27 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 64 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 48 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 16 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 9 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 24 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 15 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 4 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 48 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 49 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 24 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 14 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 48 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 4 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 3 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 28 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 7 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 14 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 29 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(tro)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY Cynthia M. Guizzetti of Bingham McCutchen LLP, PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Crown Central LLC. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/3/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
October 3, 2007 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(tro)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Chad W. Higgins for Gulf Oil, LP, Gulf Limited Liability Partnership, Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, Gulf Oil, Limited Partnership, Gulf Oil LP, Gulf Oil L.P., Gulf Oil, L.P., GULF OIL, LP, Gulf Oil LP admitted Pro Hac Vice. The Court has considered the unopposed request of Defendant Gulf Oil Limited Partnership to admit pro hac vice Chad W. Higgins, Esq. of Goodwin Procter, LLP, and the request is hereby GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/1/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(tro)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order OPINION AND ORDER # 95059: For the foregoing reasons, defendants' motion in limine is granted. When the New York plaintiffs reply on market share liability to prove causation for a particular well, they are precluded from arguing that punitive damages are available for that well, and are further precluded from presenting evidence that is relevant solely to punitive damages as to that well. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this Motion (document # 1395). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/16/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS et al.(jmi)
April 13, 2007 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/23/07 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS et al.(tro)
March 9, 2007 Filing 22 Supplement To Seventh Amended Complaint. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa, City of Galva, City of Ida Grove. (cd)
March 8, 2007 FIFTH AMENDED MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #1348)(cd)
October 26, 2006 SEVENTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Sixth Amended Complaint,,,, against Unocal Corporation, Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Marathon Oil Company, Tosco Corporation, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Shell Trading (US Company), Lyondell Chemical Company, Keck, Inc., BP Products North America Inc., Ashland, Inc., Colorado Refining Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Equistar Chemicals, L.P., Lyondell-Citgo Refining, LP, PDV Midwest Refining Co, LLC, TMR Company, TPI Petroleum, Inc., Union Oil Company of California, Valero Refining Company, Flint Hills Resources LP, Total Petrochemicals USA, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Co., Chevron Texaco Corp., Chevron USA Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corp., Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, ConocoPhillips, Equilon Enterprises, L.L.C., Exxonmobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corp., Exxonmobil Chemical Company Inc., Gulf Oil LP, Marathon Ashland Petroleum L.L.C., Marathon Oil Corp., Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises, L.L.C., Premcor Refining Group, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc., Sunoco Inc..Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa, City of Galva, City of Ida Grove. Related document: Sixth Amended Complaint,,,, filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa,, City of Galva,, City of Ida Grove,. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #1251)(cd, )
September 27, 2006 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Flint Hills Resources LP. (ORIG FLD IN 00-1898, DOC #1165)(cd, )
September 21, 2006 SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 6 Fifth Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, against Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Conoco Phillips Company, Marathon Oil Company, Tosco Corporation, Lyondell Chemical Company, Keck, Inc., BP Products North America Inc., Ashland, Inc., Colorado Refining Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Equistar Chemicals, L.P., Exxon Mobil Corporation, PDV Midwest Refining Co, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group, Inc.,, TPI Petroleum, Inc., Union Oil Company of California, Valero Refining Company, Flint Hills Resources LP, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Co., Chevron Texaco Corp., Chevron USA Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corp., Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, Equilon Enterprises, L.L.C., Exxonmobil Chemical Company Inc., Gulf Oil LP, Marathon Oil Corp., Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises, L.L.C..Document filed by City of Galva, City of Ida Grove, City of Sioux City, Iowa. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #1185) Related document: 6 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa,.(cd, )
September 18, 2006 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc.. (ORIG FLD IN 00-1898, DOC #1175)(cd, )
September 18, 2006 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Coastal States Trading Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company. (ORIG FLD IN 00-1898, DOC #1174)(cd, )
September 18, 2006 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Unocal Corporation. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #1173)(cd, )
September 18, 2006 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Chevron Chemical Co., Chevron Corporation, Chevron Texaco Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (ORIG FLD IN 00-1898, DOC #1169)(cd, )
September 18, 2006 THIRD AMENDED MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (ORIG FLD IN 00-1898, DOC #1167)(cd, )
September 18, 2006 Filing 21 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER, MASTER CROSS COMPLAINT, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero Refining Company.(cd, )
September 18, 2006 AMENDED MASTER ANSWER to Complaint, MASTER CROSS COMPLAINT, AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Total Petrochemicals USA, Inc..(cd, )
September 18, 2006 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER, MASTER CROSS COMPLAINT AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Ultramar Energy Inc., Ultramar Inc., Ultramar Limited.(cd, )
September 15, 2006 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #1164)(cd, )
September 15, 2006 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Conoco Phillips Company.(cd, )
September 15, 2006 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Co..(cd, )
September 15, 2006 Filing 20 AMENDED MASTER ANSER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, MASTER CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST DEfTS, AND MASTER THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST JOHN AND JANE DOES'S NO. 1-500. Document filed by Premcor Refining Group, Inc..(cd, )
September 15, 2006 Filing 19 SECOND AMENDED MASTER ANSWER et al to Complaint. Document filed by PDV Midwest Refining Co, LLC, Citgo Petroleum Corp., Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc..(cd, )
March 8, 2006 MOTION for Tracie Renfroe to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Total Petrochemicals USA, Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #977) (cd, )
March 8, 2006 MOTION for Tracie Renfroe to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero-Colorado Refining Company, Valero Refining Company. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #976) (cd, ).
February 27, 2006 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defts' Motion for Stay or Dismissal Without Prejudice Based on Primary Jurisdiction.
August 8, 2005 Amended Master ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Flint Hills Resources LP. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #781)(cd, )
August 8, 2005 AMENDED MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Chevron Chemical Co., Chevron Corporation, Chevron Texaco Corp., Chevron USA Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #780)(cd, )
August 3, 2005 AMENDED MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #752)(cd, )
August 1, 2005 AMENDED MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Ultramar Energy Inc., Ultramar Inc., Ultramar Limited. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #735)(cd, )
August 1, 2005 AMENDED MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero Refining Company. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #732)(cd, )
July 26, 2005 Opinion or Order OPINION & ORDER #91909,that defts' motion for certification is denied. A conf is scheduled for 9/9/05, at 10:00 am. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/25/05) (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #719) (cd, )
July 25, 2005 AMENDED MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #741)(cd, )
July 25, 2005 AMENDED MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Conoco Phillips Company. (fld orig in 00-1898, doc #729)(cd, )
July 22, 2005 AMENDED MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by PDV Midwest Refining Co, LLC, Citgo Petroleum Corp., Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #725)(cd, )
July 22, 2005 MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Unocal Corporation, Union Oil Company of California. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #724)(cd, )
July 22, 2005 AMENDED MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Exxonmobil Corp. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #722)(cd, )
July 22, 2005 MASTER ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by BP Products North America Inc. et al (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #708)(cd, )
July 19, 2005 Opinion or Order CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #11: that pre-conference letters shall be submitted purs. to the following schedule: the parties shall reach on a joint agenda eight (8) business days prior to the status conference. Parties shall file with the Court initial pre-conference letters and the agenda six (6) business days prior to the status conference. Any party wishing to file a reply letter shall do so three (3) business days prior to the status conference. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/18/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS,1:03-cv-08248-SAS,1:03-cv-09050-SAS,1:03-cv-09543-SAS,1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 1:03-cv-10051-SAS,1:03-cv-10052-SAS,1:03-cv-10053-SAS,1:03-cv-10054-SAS,1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 1:03-cv-10056-SAS,1:03-cv-10057-SAS,1:04-cv-01716-SAS,1:04-cv-01718-SAS,1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 1:04-cv-01720-SAS,1:04-cv-01721-SAS,1:04-cv-01722-SAS,1:04-cv-01723-SAS,1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 1:04-cv-01725-SAS,1:04-cv-01726-SAS,1:04-cv-01727-SAS,1:04-cv-02053-SAS,1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 1:04-cv-02056-SAS,1:04-cv-02057-SAS,1:04-cv-02059-SAS,1:04-cv-02060-SAS,1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 1:04-cv-02062-SAS,1:04-cv-02066-SAS,1:04-cv-02067-SAS,1:04-cv-02068-SAS,1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 1:04-cv-02072-SAS,1:04-cv-02388-SAS,1:04-cv-02389-SAS,1:04-cv-02390-SAS,1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 1:04-cv-03413-SAS,1:04-cv-03415-SAS,1:04-cv-03416-SAS,1:04-cv-03417-SAS,1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 1:04-cv-03419-SAS,1:04-cv-03420-SAS,1:04-cv-04968-SAS,1:04-cv-04969-SAS,1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 1:04-cv-04971-SAS,1:04-cv-04972-SAS,1:04-cv-04973-SAS,1:04-cv-04974-SAS,1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 1:04-cv-04976-SAS,1:04-cv-04990-SAS,1:04-cv-05421-SAS,1:04-cv-05422-SAS,1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 1:04-cv-05424-SAS,1:04-cv-06993-SAS(jp, )
June 13, 2005 ANSWER to Complaints. Document filed by Premcor Refining Group, Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #689)(cd, )
June 10, 2005 ANSWER to Complaints. Document filed by BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #687)(cd, )
June 9, 2005 ANSWER to Complaints. Document filed by Gulf Oil LP. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #681)(cd, )
June 2, 2005 ANSWER to Complaints. Document filed by Getty Properties Corp. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #671)(cd, )
June 2, 2005 ANSWER to Complaints. Document filed by Hess Energy, Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #668)(cd, )
June 2, 2005 ANSWER to Complaints. Document filed by El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company et al. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #670)(cd, )
June 2, 2005 ANSWER to Complaints. Document filed by Amerada Hess Corp. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #667)(cd, )
June 1, 2005 ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Mercury Fuel Service, Incorporated. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #661)(cd, )
June 1, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Leemilt's Petroleum Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #660)(cd, ).
June 1, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Conoco Phillips Company. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #656)(cd, )
June 1, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company et al. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #655)(cd, )
May 31, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Getty Petroleum Marketing, Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #654)(cd, )
May 31, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Parker Holding Company Inc, Parker Oil Company. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #652)(cd, )
May 31, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Ultramar Energy Inc., Ultramar Inc., Ultramar Limited, Colorado Refining Company, TPI Petroleum, Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #651)(cd, )
May 27, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #650)(cd, )
May 27, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Total Petrochemicals USA, Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898 doc #649)(cd, )
May 27, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Exxonmobil Corp. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #648)(cd, )
May 27, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by TMR Company, Chevron Texaco Corp., Chevron USA Inc., Texaco, Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #647)(cd, )
May 26, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero Refining Company. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #646)(cd, )
May 26, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Phibro Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #644)(cd, )
May 26, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by PDV Midwest Refining Co, LLC, Citgo Petroleum Corp., Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #645)(cd, )
May 26, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Flint Hills Resources LP. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #642)(cd, )
May 26, 2005 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco Inc. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #639)(cd, )
May 24, 2005 Disclosure purs to 4/20/05 order. Document filed by TMR Company. (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #622) (cd, )
May 23, 2005 ANSWER to the Fifth Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Mulgrew Oil Company, Keck, Inc., Fauser Oil Co. Inc.. Related document: 6 Amended Complaint filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa,.(cd, ) (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #620).
May 9, 2005 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Stephen J. Riccardulli dated 5/5/05 re: counsel for defendants requests an extension of time until 5/20/05 to submit the requested list of member defendants. Application GRANTED. Defendants may have until 5/20/05 to file a list of defendants that were members of the API, OFA and the MTBE committee, during the period of 1/1/80 to the first filing in the Connecticut and Iowa cases. This document relates to : 04cv1716, 04cv1718, 04cv1719,04cv1720, 04cv1721 and 04cv1723. Original document filed in 00cv1898 (SAS), document # 608. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/6/05) (db, )
May 3, 2005 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to deft. BP America, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. without prejudice and with each party bearing its own costs. (Orig. filed in 00 Cv 1898). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/2/05) (jf, )
April 21, 2005 Opinion or Order ORDER re opinion dated 4/20/05, defts are hereby ordered to file, by 5/6/05, a lsit of defts that were members of the API, OFA, and MTBE Committe, respectively, during the period from 1/1/80, to the date of the first filing in the above-captioned cases (orig fld in 00-1898, doc #596) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/20/05) (cd, )
April 20, 2005 OPINION #91505 that defts' motions to dismiss the complaints fld in Fl, Ks, Ma, NY, Pa, Vt, Va, and WV are denied in their entirety. Defts' motions to dismiss the complaints fld in Ct, Il, Ind, Ia, La, NH, and NJ are granted in part and denied in part, as further set forth in this document (orig fld in 00-1898, odc #591). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/20/05) copies sent by chambers.(cd, )
March 24, 2005 RESPONSE to deft Lyondell-Citgo's motion to dismiss the Iowa cases, fld by plaintiffs. (cd, )
March 17, 2005 NOTICE OF RULE 41(a)(1)(i) DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LYONDELL PETROCHEMICAL G.P. INC., NOW KNOWN AS LYONDELL LP4 INC. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the F.R.C.P., Plaintiffs in each of the actions referenced above, by counssel, hereby dismiss without prejudice Lyondell Petrochemical G.P., Inc., now Lyondell PL4 Inc. from each of the above-referenced actions, with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all other rights as against all other defendants. (Original Doc. # 171 Filed In M21-88) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/16/05) (dt, ). (Entered: 03/31/2005
January 27, 2005 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Farrell on behalf of Lyondell-Citgo Refining, LP. (jco, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Fifth Amended Complaint. Valero Refining Company served on 12/21/2004, answer due 1/10/2005. Service was accepted by Gretchen R. Groos. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa et al. (kw, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Fifth Amended Complaint. United Refining Company served on 12/14/2004, answer due 1/3/2005. Service was accepted by Mary Phillips. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa et al. (kw, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Fifth Amended Complaint. TPI Petroleum, Inc. served on 12/21/2004, answer due 1/10/2005. Service was accepted by Gretchen R. Groos. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa et al. (kw, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Fifth Amended Complaint. Sinclair Oil Corporatation served on 1/13/2005, answer due 2/2/2005. Service was accepted by Cindy Halvedson. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa et al. (kw, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Fifth Amended Complaint. Placid Refining Co., LLC served on 12/16/2004, answer due 1/5/2005. Service was accepted by Ron Hurst. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa et al. (kw, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Fifth Amended Complaint. Lyondell-Citgo Refining, LP served on 12/16/2004, answer due 1/5/2005. Service was accepted by Lynn Keys. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa et al. (kw, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to La Gloria Oil & Gas Company. Attempted Service of Summons and Fifth Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/17/04. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa et al. (kw, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Fifth Amended Complaint. Colorado Refining Company served on 12/21/2004, answer due 1/10/2005. Service was accepted by Gretchen R. Groos. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa et al. (kw, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Fifth Amended Complaint. Ashland, Inc. served on 12/17/2004, answer due 1/6/2005. Service was accepted by Nancy Zehr. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa et al. (kw, )
January 20, 2005 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Fifth Amended Complaint. American Refining Group, Inc. served on 12/14/2004, answer due 1/3/2005. Service was accepted by K. West. Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa et al. (kw, )
January 19, 2005 Joinder of certain dfts in the motion to dismiss the Iowa Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).Document filed by Lyondell Chemical Company, American Refining Group, Inc., Ashland, Inc., Colorado Refining Company, FHR/GP, LLC,, PDV Midwest Refining Co, LLC, Placid Refining Co., LLC, TMR Company, TPI Petroleum, Inc.. Original document filed in case #00cv1898, document #472.(dle, )
January 18, 2005 Opinion or Order CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #6. All case management orders requiring the production of documents or other information, previously made by the Court, shall remain in full force and effect. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each case listed in Appendix A of Case Management Order #4. This Court issued CMO #4 on 10/19/04, to govern the course of discovery in this multi-district litigation. The Court referred 5 discovery disputes to the Special Master, which he resolved on 11/12/04, through Pre-Trial Order #2. Since that time, the parties have asked the Court to amend CMO #4 to incorporate certain agreed upon language and the findings of the Special Master. There is no reason to deny the request. Accordingly, CMO #4 is modified to the extent as further set forth in this Order. Case Management Order #5 requires newly added defendants to file Rule 12 motions or other responsive pleadings by 1/18/05. However, that date does not give the parties enough time to meet and confer regarding potential Rule 12(b)(2) motions. Previous discussions between plaintiffs and the original defendants resulted in a number of voluntary dismissals. Because discussions could result in additional dismissals and avoid some motion practice, CMO #5 is modified to the extent as further set forth in this Order. The limits set forth in Rules 30 and 33 of the FRCP shall not apply in this MDL. Any disputes regarding the number of interrogatories or the number of depositions shall be decided on a case by case basis by the Special Master. Defendants may respond to the common allegations of the complaints in a Master Answer in accordance with Section 40.52(6)(b) of the Manual for Complex Litigation. However, they must also address case specific allegations to the extent they exist. Newly added defendants that intend to join in the filing of a Master Answer are not bound by the previously set deadline for responsive pleadings. The Master Answer is due 30 days after the Court's ruling on the pending 12(b)(6) motions to dismiss. Defendants are not precluded from arguing, at the appropriate time, both prongs of their conflict preemption defense. The parties are permitted to take discovery regarding the quantity of oxygenates available to implement the Reformulated Gasoline Program. This discovery is aimed at preparing defendants' potential motion for summary judgment based on the impossibility of complying with both state and federal requirements. At this time, they are not permitted to take discovery regarding frustration of purpose. To the extent there are no genuine issues of material fact, defendants may bring a summary judgment motion based on the impossibility prong of conflict preemption. They may argue frustration of purpose only to the extent it is based on the same factual predicate as the impossibility argument. The parties shall meet and confer regarding the preservation of "current" back-up tapes. They should use Section A of the Court's proposed Document Retention Questionnaire as a starting point for discussions. Defendants shall submit responses to Sections B and C of the Questionnaire to the Court and plaintiffs by 2/3/05 (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/14/05) Original entry in 00cv1898 document number 458.(yv, )
December 16, 2004 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant La Gloria Oil and Gas Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P., without prejudice from each of these following action 04cv2060, 04cv2059, 04cv2061, 04cv2062, 04cv1723, with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all other rights against all other defendants. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/15/04)... Original Document filed in M21-88, Doc. #135. (sac, )
October 29, 2004 Filing 6 FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against ARCO Chemical Co., ARCO Products Co., Alon USA Energy Inc., Alon USA LP, Amerada Hess Corp., American Refining Group, Inc., Amoco Corporation, Ashland, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, Atofina Petrochemicals, Inc, BP Amoco, BP Amoco Chemical Co., BP Products North America Inc., BP West Coast Products L.L.C., Chevron Chemical Co., Chevron Corporation, Chevron Texaco Corp., Chevron USA Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corp., Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Coastal Refining Marketing, Coastal States Trading Inc., Colorado Refining Company, Conoco Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, ConocoPhillips, Crwon Central Petroleum Corporation, Diamond Shamrock Refining and Marketing Company, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Equilon Enterprises, L.L.C., Equistar Chemicals, L.P., Equiva Trading Co., Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxonmobil Chemical Company Inc., Exxonmobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corp., Exxonmobil PipeLine Company, Exxonmobil Refining and Supply Company, FHR/GP, LLC,, Fauser Oil Co. Inc., Fina Oil & Chemical Company, Galva City of, Getty Petroleum Marketing, Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Gulf Oil LP, Ida Grove City of, Keck, Inc., Koch Industries Inc., La Gloria Oil & Gas Company, Louisiana Valero Refining Company, Lyondell Chemical Company, Lyondell Petrochemical GP, Inc.,, Lyondell-Citgo Refining, LP, Marathon Ashland Petroleum L.L.C., Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corp., Mobil Corporation, Mobil Oil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises, L.L.C., Mulgrew Oil Company, New Jersey Valero Refining Company, PDV Midwest Refining Co, LLC, Phillips 66 Company, Phillips Petroleum Company, Placid Refining Co., LLC, Premcor Inc., Premcor Refining Group, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc., Shell Trading (US Company), Sinclair Oil Corporatation, Sinclair Oil Corporation, Star Enterprise, Sun Refining & Marketing, Sunoco Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), TMR Company, TPI Petroleum, Inc., Tesoro Petro Corp., Tesoro Refining and Marketing, Texaco Refining & Marketing (East), Inc., Texaco Refining & Marketing(East), INc., Texaco, Inc., Texas Valero Refining Company, The Premcor Refining Group, Inc.,, Tosco Corporation, Tosco Corporation,, Tosco Refining Co., Total Fina Elf, Total Holdings USA, Inc., Union Oil Company of California, United Refining Company, Unocal Corporation, Unocal Corporation,, Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero-Colorado Refining Company.Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa.(db, )
September 3, 2004 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION # 90611 that for the reasons set forth in this opinion this court has federal agent jurisdiction over certain California, Indiana, Vermont and Virginia cases and bankruptcy jurisdiction over all consolidated cases. Dfts have met their burden of establishing federal subject matter jurisdiction and their right to removal. The clerk of the court is directed to close these motions. A conference is scheduled for 9/23/04 at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/3/04) (dle, ) Original document filed in case #00cv1898, document #341.
August 30, 2004 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. as to Premcor Inc. w/out prejudice and w/ each party to bear its own costs. (Orig. doc. filed in case no. M21-88, MDL No. 1358 as doc. #102) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/26/04) (ae, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 5 PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition of defendants' motion to dismiss the IOWA Complaints and Amended Complaints pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa, Ida Grove City of. (db, )
August 11, 2004 Opinion or Order ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Dismissal purs to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the FRCP without prejudice Flint Hills Resources, LLC from each of the referenced actions, with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs reserve all other rights as against all of defendants. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/9/04); (orig. docmt dktd in case no. M21-88, docmt #88)(djc, )
June 21, 2004 Filing 4 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 3 Amended Complaint, against Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Shell Trading (US Company), Lyondell Chemical Company, Keck, Inc., El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atofina Petrochemicals, Inc, Alon USA Energy Inc., Alon USA LP, Amerada Hess Corp., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Co., Chevron Texaco Corp., Chevron USA Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corp., Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Conoco Phillips Company, ConocoPhillips, Crwon Central Petroleum Corporation, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, Equilon Enterprises, L.L.C., Exxonmobil Chemical Company Inc., Exxonmobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corp., Fauser Oil Co. Inc., Gulf Oil LP, Koch Industries Inc., Marathon Ashland Petroleum L.L.C., Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corp., Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises, L.L.C., Mulgrew Oil Company, Premcor Inc., Premcor Refining Group, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc., Sunoco Inc., Texaco Refining & Marketing (East), Inc., Texaco, Inc., Tosco Corporation, Total Holdings USA, Inc., Unocal Corporation, Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company.Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa, Galva City of, Ida Grove City of. Related document: 3 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa, Galva City of, Ida Grove City of.(djc, )
June 21, 2004 Set Answer Due Date re: 4 Amended Complaint,,,,, as to Alon USA Energy Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Alon USA LP answer due on 7/1/2004; Amerada Hess Corp. answer due on 7/1/2004; Atlantic Richfield Company answer due on 7/1/2004; BP Amoco Chemical Co. answer due on 7/1/2004; Chevron Texaco Corp. answer due on 7/1/2004; Chevron USA Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Citgo Petroleum Corp. answer due on 7/1/2004; Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company answer due on 7/1/2004; Coastal Mobile Refining Company answer due on 7/1/2004; Conoco Phillips Company answer due on 7/1/2004; Crwon Central Petroleum Corporation answer due on 7/1/2004; El Paso CGP Company answer due on 7/1/2004; El Paso Corporation answer due on 7/1/2004; Equilon Enterprises, L.L.C. answer due on 7/1/2004; Exxonmobil Corp. answer due on 7/1/2004; Exxonmobil Oil Corp. answer due on 7/1/2004; Fauser Oil Co. Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Koch Industries Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Lyondell Chemical Company answer due on 7/1/2004; Marathon Ashland Petroleum L.L.C. answer due on 7/1/2004; Marathon Oil Company answer due on 7/1/2004; Marathon Oil Corp. answer due on 7/1/2004; Mobil Corporation answer due on 7/1/2004; Motiva Enterprises, L.L.C. answer due on 7/1/2004; Mulgrew Oil Company answer due on 7/1/2004; Premcor Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Premcor Refining Group, Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Shell Oil Company answer due on 7/1/2004; Shell Oil Products Company, LLC answer due on 7/1/2004; Shell Petroleum Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Texaco Refining & Marketing (East), Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Texaco, Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Tosco Corporation answer due on 7/1/2004; Total Holdings USA, Inc. answer due on 7/1/2004; Unocal Corporation answer due on 7/1/2004; Valero Energy Corp. answer due on 7/1/2004; Valero Marketing and Supply Company answer due on 7/1/2004; Valero Refining and Marketing Company answer due on 7/1/2004. (djc, )
April 28, 2004 Filing 3 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Amended Complaint,,,, against Alon USA Energy Inc., Alon USA LP, Amerada Hess Corp., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Co., Chevron Texaco Corp., Chevron USA Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corp., Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Conoco Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, ConocoPhillips, Crwon Central Petroleum Corporation, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, Equilon Enterprises, L.L.C., Exxonmobil Chemical Company Inc., Exxonmobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corp., Fauser Oil Co. Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Gulf Oil LP, Koch Industries Inc., Marathon Ashland Petroleum L.L.C., Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corp., Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises, L.L.C., Mulgrew Oil Company, Premcor Inc., Premcor Refining Group, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Inc., Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum Inc., Sunoco Inc., Texaco Refining & Marketing (East), Inc., Texaco, Inc., Tosco Corporation, Total Holdings USA, Inc., Unocal Corporation, Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company.Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa, Galva City of, Ida Grove City of. Related document: 2 Amended Complaint filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa, Galva City of, Ida Grove City of.(jco, )
April 22, 2004 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alon USA Energy Inc., Alon USA LP, Amerada Hess Corp., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Co., Chevron Texaco Corp., Chevron USA Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corp., Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Conoco Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, ConocoPhillips, Crwon Central Petroleum Corporation, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, Equilon Enterprises, L.L.C., Exxonmobil Chemical Company Inc., Exxonmobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corp., Fauser Oil Co. Inc., Gulf Oil Corporation, Gulf Oil LP, Koch Industries Inc., Marathon Ashland Petroleum L.L.C., Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corp., Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises, L.L.C., Mulgrew Oil Company, Premcor Inc., Premcor Refining Group, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Inc., Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum Inc., Sunoco Inc., Texaco Refining & Marketing (East), Inc., Texaco, Inc., Tosco Corporation, Total Holdings USA, Inc., Unocal Corporation, Valero Energy Corp., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company.Document filed by City of Sioux City, Iowa, Galva City of, Ida Grove City of.(jco, )
March 26, 2004 Mailed letter to the United States District Court - Southern District of Iowa acknowledging receipt of their entire file, a certified copy of the transfer order and docket entries. (laq, )
March 26, 2004 Mailed notice with Rules 2 & 3 to the attorney(s) of record. (laq, )
March 16, 2004 MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 1-39 from the United States District Court - Southern District of Iowa. Case Number: 2:03-cv-90663(RWP), MDL Number: MDL 1358. (laq, )
March 2, 2004 RELATED CASES: Create association to 1:00-cv-01898-SAS.. (lb)
March 2, 2004 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Case consolidated with 1:00-cv-1898. (yv, )
March 2, 2004 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED TO 1:00-cv-1898. Notice of Assignment to follow. (yv, )
March 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - Southern District of Iowa, Case Number: 4:03-cv-90663, MDL Number: MDL 1358, M Number: M 21-88, to the United States District Court - Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 2/6/04) (jjm, )
March 2, 2004 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (jjm, )
March 2, 2004 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED TO MDL 1358 and M 21-88. (jjm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Sioux City, Iowa v. Amerada Hess Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company ,individualy and doing business as ARCO products Company (f/k/a Arco Petroleum Co.), and also known as ARCO
Represented By: Mark Steven Lillie
Represented By: Christina Lynn Henk
Represented By: Sylvia Nichole Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Amoco Chemical Co.
Represented By: Mark Steven Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Texaco Corp. ,individualy and formerly known as Gulf Oil Corporation (d/b/a Chevron Products Company, d/b/a Chevron Chemical Company)
Represented By: David A. Grenardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc. ,individually and formerly known as Guylf Oil Corp. (d/b/a Chevron Products Company, d/b/a Chevron Chemical Company, LP
Represented By: David A. Grenardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premcor Refining Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining and Marketing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conoco Phillips Company individually and as successor-in-interest to Conoco Inc. and Phillips Petroleum Company doing business as Phillips 66 Company formerly known as Coastal States Trading, Inc.
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tosco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Holdings USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atofina Petrochemicals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMR Company
Represented By: Alec C. Zacaroli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tosco Corporation,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unocal Corporation,
Represented By: David A. Grenardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerada Hess Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amoco Corporation
Represented By: Mark Steven Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCO Chemical Co.
Represented By: Mark Steven Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCO
Represented By: Mark Steven Lillie
Represented By: Christina Lynn Henk
Represented By: Sylvia Nichole Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Amoco
Represented By: Mark Steven Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amoco Chemical Company
Represented By: Mark Steven Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP West Coast Products L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark Steven Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Chemical Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: David A. Grenardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Oil Corporation (d
Represented By: David A. Grenardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guylf Oil Corp. (d
Represented By: David A. Grenardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citgo Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: Anthony J. Stoik
Represented By: Nathan Philip Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citgo Refining and Chemical Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Stoik
Represented By: Nathan Philip Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Mobile Refining Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Refining Marketing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conoco Inc.
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crwon Central Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso CGP Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equiva Trading Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxonmobil Corp.
Represented By: Robert V P Waterman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxonmobil Oil Corp.
Represented By: Robert V P Waterman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxonmobil PipeLine Company
Represented By: Robert V P Waterman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxonmobil Chemical Company Inc.
Represented By: Robert V P Waterman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxonmobil Refining and Supply Company
Represented By: Robert V P Waterman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fauser Oil Co. Inc.
Represented By: Larry G. Gutz
Represented By: Mark Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getty Petroleum Marketing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Oil LP
Represented By: Chad W. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Industries Inc.
Represented By: Charles F. Becker
Represented By: William P. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Ashland Petroleum L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Robert V P Waterman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Robert V P Waterman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motiva Enterprises, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Petroleum Company
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Group LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Petroleum Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Enterprise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Refining & Marketing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Company Inc. R & M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Grenardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Refining & Marketing (East), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Refining & Marketing(East), INc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tosco Refining Co.
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unocal Corporation
Represented By: David A. Grenardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Corp.
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Represented By: J. Clifford Gunter, III
Represented By: Kevin M. McDonald
Represented By: M. Coy Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Represented By: J. Clifford Gunter, III
Represented By: Kevin M. McDonald
Represented By: M. Coy Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Refining and Marketing Company
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Represented By: J. Clifford Gunter, III
Represented By: Kevin M. McDonald
Represented By: M. Coy Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero-Colorado Refining Company
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alon USA Energy Inc.
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Represented By: M. Coy Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alon USA LP
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Represented By: M. Coy Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCO Products Co.
Represented By: Mark Steven Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal States Trading Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Shamrock Refining and Marketing Company
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fina Oil & Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Petro Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro West Coast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Fina Elf
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Valero Refining Company
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Valero Refining Company
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Jersey Valero Refining Company
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal States Trading, Inc.
Represented By: Frank M. Grenard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulgrew Oil Company
Represented By: Mark Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premcor Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tosco Refining Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tosco Marketing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco, Inc. (R&M)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Trading (US Company)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyondell Chemical Company
Represented By: Alan Jay Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keck, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc.
Represented By: Christina Lynn Henk
Represented By: Sylvia Nichole Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fina Oil and Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Refining Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Refining Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equistar Chemicals, L.P.
Represented By: Alan Jay Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation formally known as Exxon Corporation (and d/b/a Exxonmobil Refining and Supply Company, Exxon Chemical U.S.A. and ExxonMobil Oil Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FHR/GP, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Gloria Oil & Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyondell-Citgo Refining, LP
Represented By: Thomas M. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyondell Petrochemical GP, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDV Midwest Refining Co, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placid Refining Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Premcor Refining Group, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Oil Corporatation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Refining and Marketing (East), Inc)
Represented By: Alec C. Zacaroli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tosco Refining Company, and also known as Tosco Marketing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPI Petroleum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Company of California d/b/a Unocal
Represented By: David A. Grenardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Refining Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Comnpany of California
Represented By: David A. Grenardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Refining Company
Represented By: M. Coy Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint Hills Resources LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phibro Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Petrochemicals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Eduardo S. Perez
Represented By: Julie K. Huff
Represented By: M. Coy Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultramar Energy Inc.
Represented By: J. Clifford Gunter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultramar Inc.
Represented By: J. Clifford Gunter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultramar Limited
Represented By: J. Clifford Gunter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Holding Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leemilt's Petroleum Inc.
Represented By: John Christie II McMeekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Fuel Service, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getty Properties Corp.
Represented By: John Christie II McMeekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Ronald J. Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sioux City, Iowa
Represented By: David T. Ritter
Represented By: Paul Scott Summy
Represented By: Robert J. Gordon
Represented By: Roxanne Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galva City of
Represented By: David T. Ritter
Represented By: Robert J. Gordon
Represented By: Roxanne Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Grove City of
Represented By: David T. Ritter
Represented By: Robert J. Gordon
Represented By: Roxanne Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Galva
Represented By: David T. Ritter
Represented By: Paul Scott Summy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Ida Grove
Represented By: David T. Ritter
Represented By: Paul Scott Summy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?