In Re: Oxycontin Antitrust Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Steve White, City of New York, Melinda Wittefeldt, Archie Pressley, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Rita Halban, Drug Mart Tallman, Inc., Birmingham Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 91 Health and Welfare Fund, Derick Giwner, Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Carolyn Lemaster, The Purdue Frederick Company, Winthrop-University Hospital, Grunenenthal GMBH, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Nease Woodson, Mark Klein, Painters District Council No. 30 Health and Welfare Plan, Care Pharmacies, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Betts Tully, Albertson's. Inc., Jane Schooley, The Purdue Pharama Company, Carol Puerling, Police Sergeant Steven Bennett, Vasken Aznavorian, Meijer Inc., Weaver/ Presley, David Norris, Purdue Pharma L.P., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, The County of Suffolk, NDW York, SAJ Distributors, Inc., Local 1199 National Benefit Fund for Health and Human Services Employees, A.F. of L. - A.G.C Building Trades Welfare Plan, John Walpole, Martin Ayala, United Federation of Teachers Welfare Fund, Rhodes Technologies, Williams, Prisella Ridgell, Connecticut Citizen Action Group, Maxi Drug, Inc., Gary Jaffe, IBEW-NECA Local 505 Health & Welfare Plan, Health Partners, Inc., John Doran, Walgreen Co., Humana, Inc., Mechanical Contractors-UA Local 119 Welfare Plan, Michael Lissy, Carolyn Brewer, United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Neighborcare, Inc., American Sales Co., Inc., Winthrop University Hospital, Medica Health Plans of Wisconsin, Sharon Morganti, Vista Healthplan, Inc., Paper, Allied-Industrial, Chemical and Energy Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, Roy Charles May, Chaballa, Stephen LaFrance Holdings, Inc., Ashley Kooman, Man-U Service Contract Fund, Medica Health Plans, Aetna, Inc., Adam Nathanson, Purdue Phama L.P., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Medic Drug Inc., Medica Insurance Company, Arkansas Carpenters' Health & Welfare Fund, Michael Breeden, The Kroger Co., Health Care for All, Lenanne Whittle, Kenya Proctor, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Pamela Krause and Laura Dzierlatka
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Purdue Pharma, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis Totowa LLC, Varam, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma Company, Mylan Inc., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A., PF Lab Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., PRA Holdings, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., KV Pharmaceutical Company, Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Coporation and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Petitioner: James R. Dugan, II
Not Yet Classified: Noramco Inc.
Case Number: 1:2004md01603
Filed: April 23, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Sidney H Stein
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 687 AMENDED CONSENT JUDGMENT (CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., AND RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, AND ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC) amending (546 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 277 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS) Consent Judgment: it is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed as follows: Terms used in this amended Consent Judgment and not otherwise defined shall have the meanings ascribed thereto in the Settlement Agreement, dated as of April 25, 2013, by and among Purdue and Acta vis (the "Settlement Agreement"). Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. ("Teva Ltd.") acquired Actavis including the Actavis ANDAs and Actavis Products. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ("Teva USA"), an affiliate of Teva Ltd., previously settled its controlled release oxycodone litigation with the Purdue Companies in Civil Action Nos. 13-cv-4606-SHS and 14-cv-2357-SHS before this Court pursuant to a settlement agreement and related documents, which have recently been modified (the "Teva Settlement Documents"). As a result of Teva Ltd.'s acquisition of Actavis, Actavis is not precluded from making, having made, using, offering to sell, selling, shipping, distributing or importing Teva Products (as defined in the Teva Settlement Documents) as Teva's affiliates pursuant to the modified Teva Settlement Documents. The Low ABUK Patents are valid and enforceable with respect to the Actavis ANDAs and any products described therein and will be valid and enforceable with respect to any other AND As and Section 505(b) applications filed by or on behalf of Actavis after the Settlement Date which reference the Purdue NDAs (any such ANDAs and applications are herein referred to as "New ANDAs") and any products described therein. The products described in the Actavis ANDAs infringe the Low ABUK Patents. The filing of a New ANDAs will infringe the Low ABUK Patents to the extent that any of the products described in such New ANDA contain oxycodone or salts thereof, including oxycodone hydrochloride, with 25 ppm 14-hydroxycodeinone or less. Nothing contained in this paragraph 3 shall be deemed to confer any rights on any party other than the Parties and their Affiliates. Unless otherwise expressly permitted pursuant to the terms of the Teva Settlement Documents, Actavis agrees that it will not market, sell, distribute, participate in the profits of or indemnify others for infringement with respect to any product described in any ANDA or Section 505(b)(2) application that references the Purdue NDAs until the Terminal Date (as defined in the Teva Settlement Documents). Actavis waives any possible antitrust or other claims against the Plaintiffs based on conduct or events that have occurred prior to the original date of entry of the Consent Judgment relating to the Low ABUK Patents, as well as any claims or counterclaims that could have been pleaded in Civil Action No. 10-cv-03734-SHS (the "Action"), and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/29/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(tn)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 686 AMENDED CONSENT JUDGMENT (CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC, AND PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P. AND WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. - FLORIDA, AND ANDRX LABS, LLC) amending #550 Consent Judgment: it is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed as follows: Terms used in this amended Consent Judgment and not otherwise defined shall have the meanings ascribed thereto in the Settlement Agreement, dated as of April 25, 2013, by and among Purdue and Watson (the "Settlement Agreement"). Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. ("Teva Ltd.") acquired Defendants including the Watson ANDAs, Actavis ANDAs and Actavis Products. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ("Teva USA"), an affiliate of Teva Ltd., previously settled its controlled release oxycodone litigation with the Purdue Companies in Civil Action Nos. 13-cv-4606-SHS and 14-cv-2357-SHS before this Court pursuant to a settlement agreement and related documents, which have recently been modified (the "Teva Settlement Documents"). As a result of Teva Ltd.'s acquisition of Defendants, Defendants are not precluded from making, having made, using, offering to sell, selling, shipping, distributing or importing Teva Products (as defined in the Teva Settlement Documents) as Teva's affiliates pursuant to the modified Teva Settlement Documents. U.S. Patent No. 8,337,888 (the "'888 Patent") is valid and enforceable with respect to the Watson ANDAs and any products described therein and will be valid and enforceable with respect to any other ANDAs and Section 505(b) applications filed by or on behalf of Watson after the Signing Date which reference the Purdue NDAs (any such ANDAs and application are herein referred to as "New ANDAs") and any products described therein. The products described in the Watson ANDAs infringe the '888 Patent. The filing of any New ANDA will infringe the '888 Patent to the extent that any of the products described in such New ANDA contain a sufficient amount of polyethylene oxide to impart a viscosity of at least about 10 cP when subjected to tampering by dissolution in from about 0.5 to about 10 ml aqueous liquid. Nothing contained in this paragraph 3 shall be deemed to confer any rights on any party other than the Parties and their Affiliates. Unless otherwise expressly permitted pursuant to the terms of the Teva Settlement Documents, Watson agrees that it will not market, sell, distribute, participate in the profits of or indemnify others for infringement with respect to any product described in any ANDA or Section SOS(b)(2) application that references the Purdue NDAs until the Terminal Date (as defined in the Teva Settlement Documents). Watson's Counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice. Further. Watson waives any possible antitrust or other claims against Purdue based on conduct or events that have occurred prior to the original date of entry of the Consent Judgment relating to the '888 Patent, as well as any claims or counterclaims that could have been pleaded in Civil Action No. 13-cv-1272-SHS (the "Action"), and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/29/2016) (tn)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 685 AMENDED CONSENT JUDGMENT (CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, AND GRUNENTHAL GMBH AND WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. - FLORIDA, AND ANDRX LABS, LLC) amending #547 Consent Judgment: it is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed as follows: Terms used in this amended Consent Judgment and not otherwise defined shall have the meanings ascribed thereto in the Settlement Agreement, dated as of April 25, 2013, by and among Purdue and Watson (the "Settlement Agreement"). Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. ("Teva Ltd.") acquired Defendants including the Watson ANDAs, Actavis ANDAs and Actavis Products. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ("Teva USA"), an affiliate of Teva Ltd., previously settled its controlled release oxycodone litigation with the Purdue Companies in the Civil Action Nos. 13-cv-4606 (SHS) and 14-cv-2357 (SHS) before this Court pursuant to a settlement agreement and related documents, which have recently been modified (the "Teva Settlement Documents"). As a result of Teva Ltd.'s acquisition of Defendants, Defendants are not precluded from making, having made, using, offering to sell, selling, shipping, distributing or importing Teva Products (as defined in the Teva Settlement Documents) as Teva's affiliates pursuant to the modified Teva Settlement Documents. U.S. Patent Nos. 6,488,963, 7,674,799, 7,674,800, 7,683,072 and 7,776,314 (collectively, the "CV-2036 Patents") are valid and enforceable with respect to the Watson AND As and any products described therein and will be valid and enforceable with respect to any other ANDAs and Section 505(b) applications filed by or on behalf of Watson after the Signing Date which reference the Purdue NDAs (any such ANDAs and applications are herein referred to as "New ANDAs") and any products described therein. The products described in the Watson ANDAs infringe the CV-2036 Patents. The filing of any New ANDAs will infringe U.S. Patent Nos. 7,674,799, 7,674,800, 7,683,072 and 6,488,963; provided that, (i) U.S. Patent Nos. 7,674,799, 7,674,800 and 7,683,072 shall be infringed upon the filing of a New ANDA to the extent that any of the products described in such New ANDA contain oxycodone or salts thereof, including oxycodone hydrochloride, with 25 ppm 14-hydroxycodeinone or less, and (ii) U.S. Patent No. 6,488,963 shall be infringed upon the filing of a New ANDA to the extent that any of the products described in such New ANDA contain any polyethylene oxide with a molecular weight greater than 900,000 Daltons but less than 11,000,000 Daltons. Nothing contained in this paragraph 3 shall be deemed to confer any rights on any party other than the Parties and their Affiliates, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/29/2016) (tn)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 684 AMENDED CONSENT JUDGMENT (CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., AND GRUNENTHAL GMBH AND WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. - FLORIDA) amending (24 in 1:12-cv-03111-SHS, 548 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Consent Judgment: Terms used in this amended Consent Judgment and not otherwise defined shall have the meanings ascribed thereto in the Settlement Agreement, dated as of April 25, 2013, by and among Purdue and Watson (the "Settlement Agreement"). Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. ("Teva Ltd.") acquired Defendant including the Watson ANDAs, Actavis ANDAs and Actavis Products. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ("Teva USA"), an affiliate of Teva Ltd., previously settled its controlled release oxycodone litigation with the Purdue Companies in Civil Action Nos. 13-cv-4606-SHS and 14-cv-2357-SHS before this Court pursuant to a settlement agreement and related documents, which have recently been modified (the "Teva Settlement Documents"). As a result of Teva Ltd.'s acquisition of Defendant, Defendant is not precluded from making, having made, using, offering to sell, selling, shipping, distributing or importing Teva Products (as defined in the Teva Settlement Documents) as Teva's affiliates pursuant to the modified Teva Settlement Documents. U.S. Patent No. 8,114,383 (the "'383 Patent") is valid and enforceable with respect to the Watson ANDAs and any products described therein and will be valid and enforceable with respect to any other ANDAs and Section 505(b) applications filed by or on behalf of Watson after the Signing Date which reference the Purdue NDAs (any such ANDAs and applications are herein referred to as "New ANDAs") and any products described therein. The products described in the Watson ANDAs infringe the '383 Patent. Nothing contained in this paragraph 3 shall be deemed to confer any rights on any party other than the Parties and their Affiliates. Except as provided for or may be agreed to in writing by the Parties in the Teva Settlement Documents, from and after April 25, 2013, Watson, including any of its successors and assigns, and any of its or their respective officers, agents, servants, employees and attorneys and those persons in active concert or participation with Watson, are enjoined from (a) infringing the '383 Patent, with respect to the Teva Products; provided, however, that the provisions of this paragraph shall not apply following the Terminal Date (as defined in the Teva Settlement Documents) or as otherwise provided in the Teva Settlement Documents. Watson waives any possible antitrust or other claims against the Plaintiffs based on conduct or events that have occurred prior to the original date of entry of the Consent Judgment relating to the '383 Patent, as well as any claims or counterclaims that could have been pleaded in Civil Action No. 12-cv-3111-SHS (the "Action"), and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/29/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:12-cv-03111-SHS(tn)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 683 AMENDED CONSENT JUDGMENT (CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P. AND GRUNENTHAL GMBH AND WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. - FLORIDA, AND ANDRX LABS, LLC) amending #549 Consent Judgment, in favor of Grunenenthal GMBH, Purdue Phama L.P. against Watson Laboratories, Inc.: it is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed as follows: Terms used in this amended Consent Judgment and not otherwise defined shall have the meanings ascribed thereto in the Settlement Agreement, dated as of April 25, 2013, by and among Purdue and Watson (the "Settlement Agreement"). Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. ("Teva Ltd.") acquired Defendants including the Watson ANDAs, Actavis ANDAs and Actavis Products. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ("Teva USA"), an affiliate of Teva Ltd., previously settled its controlled release oxycodone litigation with the Purdue Companies in Civil Action Nos. 13-cv-4606-SHS and 14-cv-2357-SHS before this Court pursuant to a settlement agreement and related documents, which have recently been modified (the "Teva Settlement Documents"). As a result of Teva Ltd.'s acquisition of Defendant, Defendant is not precluded from making, having made, using, offering to sell, selling, shipping, distributing or importing Teva Products (as defined in the Teva Settlement Documents) as Teva's affiliates pursuant to the modified Teva Settlement Documents. U.S. Patent No. 8,309,060 (the "'060 Patent") is valid and enforceable with respect to the Watson ANDAs and any products described therein and will be valid and enforceable with respect to any other ANDAs and Section 505(b) applications filed by or on behalf of Watson after the Signing Date which reference the Purdue NDAs (any such ANDAs and applications are herein referred to as "New ANDAs") and any products described therein. Except as provided for or may be agreed to in writing by the Parties in the Teva Settlement Documents, from and after April 25, 2013, Watson, including any of its successors and assigns, and any of its or their respective officers, agents, servants, employees and attorneys and those persons in active concert or participation with Watson, are enjoined from infringing the '060 Patent, with respect to the Teva Products provided, however, that the provisions of this paragraph shalt not apply following the Terminal Date (as defined in the Teva Settlement Documents) or as otherwise provided in the Teva Settlement Documents. Watson's Counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice. Further, Watson waives any possible antitrust or other claims against the Plaintiffs based on conduct or events that have occurred prior to the original date of entry of the Consent Judgment relating to the '060 Patent, as well as any claims or counterclaims that could have been pleaded in Civil Action No. 13-cv-00762-SHS (the "Action"), and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/29/2016) (tn) Modified on 8/30/2016 (tn).
April 9, 2015 Filing 682 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, the Court Orders as follows:1. Plaintiffs' requests for relief is denied. 2. The following declaratory judgment is entered in favor of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, and against plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., and Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P.: Claims 5,7,23, and 24 of U.S. Patent No. 8,337,888 are invalid.3. Amneal's counterclaim for declaratory judgment of non-infringement of claims 5,7,23, and 24 of U.S. Patent No. 8,337,888 is denied. 4. No attorneys fees will be awarded, because the prevailing party, Amneal Pharmaceuticals,LLC, has not demonstrated that this is an exceptional case. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 4/9/2015) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal, #2 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Main Document 682 replaced on 4/9/2015) (dt).
April 8, 2015 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #681 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (ama)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 681 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: Based on the findings of fact and conclusions of law articulated above, the Court hereby ORDERS the following: 1. Plaintiffs' requests for relief are denied. 2. The following declaratory judgment shall enter in favor of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, and against plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., and Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P.: Claims 5, 7, 23, and 24 of U.S. Patent No. 8,337,888 are invalid. 3. Amneal' s counterclaim for declaratory judgment of non-infringementof claims 5, 7, 23, and 24 of U.S. Patent No. 8,337,888 is denied. 4. No attorney's fees will be awarded because the prevailing party, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, has not demonstrated that this is an exceptional case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/08/2015) (ama)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER: In light of the consent judgment filed today, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for judgment on the pleadings (Dkt. No 53), defendant's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 58), and defendant's motion in limine (Dkt. No. 66) are dismissed as moot. SO ORDERED. (Original document filed in 14-cv-2357 doc. # 81). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/23/2014) (ama)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 679 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., AND GRUNENTHAL GMBH, AND TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.: It is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed as follows: Terms used in this Consent Judgment and not otherwise defined,shall have the meanings ascribed thereto in the Settlement Documents, dated as of December 18,2014, by and among the Purdue Companies and Teva (the "Settlement Documents"). Civil Action No. 13-cv-4606 (SHS) (the "Subsequent Action"), including all claims and counterclaims, is hereby dismissed with prejudice with respect to the Teva ANDA and Teva Products. Teva waives any possible antitrust or other claims against the Plaintiffs based on conduct or events that have occurred prior to the Signing Date relating to the Existing ANDA and the products described therein, the Specified Patents, as well as any claims or counterclaims that could have been pleaded in the Subsequent Action. This Consent Judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Subsequent Action is hereby dismissed without costs or attorney's fees, save that this District Court shall retain jurisdiction over the Subsequent Action, including, without limitation, over implementation of, or disputes arising out of, this Consent Judgment or the settlement of the Subsequent Action. A prevailing party shall be entitled to recover attorney's fees in any such proceeding occurringafter the entering of this Consent Judgment in which the case is found to be an exceptional one. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/23/2014) (ama)
December 16, 2014 Filing 678 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Mark D. Schuman dated 12/12/2014 re: Counsel requests permission to bring certain technology and documents into the courtroom for the duration of trial, set to begin on January 21, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/16/2014) (mro)
August 29, 2014 Filing 677 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
August 29, 2014 Filing 676 NOTICE of Joint Trial Transcript Errata. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Goldman, Robert)
August 22, 2014 Filing 675 RESPONSE Post-Trial Brief. Document filed by Grunenenthal GMBH, Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Goldman, Robert)
August 8, 2014 Filing 674 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 5, 2014 Filing 673 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 672 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Paula L. Blizzard dated 7/30/2014 re: I write to request permission to withdraw from this matter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/4/2014) (kgo)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Jennell C. Bilek dated 7/23/2014 re: I write on behalf of Defendants requesting that Your Honor admit into evidence the following exhibits. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/24/2014) (kgo)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER: The trial of these actions having been completed on July 18, 2014, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Each side's post trial brief for the issues on which it bears the burden of proof is due on or before August 8, 2014, and shall not exceed 35 pages; 2. Responding briefs are due on or before August 22, 2014, and shall not exceed 25 pages; 3. Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law are due on or before August 29, 2014; and 4. Reply briefs are due on or before August 29, 2014, and shall not exceed 20 pages. (Responses due by 8/22/2014. Replies due by 8/29/2014.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/20/2014) (kgo)
July 18, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 8/8/2014. Motions due by 7/21/2014. Responses due by 7/28/2014 Reply to Response to Brief due by 8/29/2014. Responses to Brief due by 8/22/2014 (mro)
July 18, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial completed on 7/18/2014. All parties present. Trial continues. Plaintiffs rest. Defendants rest. Defendants' motion under Rule 52(c) is due July 21, plaintiffs' response is due by July 28, 2014. Post-trial briefing schedule ordered: opening briefs due August 8, 2014, rebuttal briefs due August 22, 2014, reply briefs and proposed findings of fact due August 29, 2014. Trial concluded. (mro)
July 17, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 7/17/2014. All parties present. Trial continues. (mro)
July 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 7/16/2014. All parties present. Trial continues. The plaintiffs rest. The defendants begin their case. (mro)
July 15, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 7/15/2014. All parties present. Trial continues. (mro)
July 14, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial begun on 7/14/2014. All parties present. Opening statements by both sides. The plaintiffs begin their case. (mro)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER AMENDING FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND THE JUDGMENT IN THESE ACTIONS: It is hereby ORDERED that the January 22, 2014, Judgment is amended by adding the following language to the end of the paragraph beginning "Whereas" on page 1 and to the end of the decretal paragraph on page 2: "5. Teva's counterclaims for declaratory judgment of non-infringement of claims 3 and 19 of U.S. Patent No. 7,674,799; claims 30-34 and 76-79 of U.S. Patent No. 7,674,800; claims 1, 4, and 5 of U.S. Patent No. 7,683,072; and claims 1, 2, 5, 7, and 8 of U.S. Patent No. 8,114,383 are denied." (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/14/2014) (kgo)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER: Plaintiffs have moved in limine to preclude defendant Teva from "supplementing its expert reports to offer any expert testimony regarding the validity of the asserted claims" of the '060 Patent "using a claim construction that requires the 'viscosity-increasing agent (b) to be a different ingredient than the 'synthetic or natural polymer (C)' of claim 1." (Pls.' Mem. of Law in Supp. of Mot. in Limine ("Pls.' Mem.") 1.) That motion is denied. The trial will commence on July 14, 2014 at 10 a.m., as previously scheduled. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/11/2014) (kgo)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the trial in the above action will begin at 10:00 a.m. on Monday, July 14, 2014. (Bench Trial set for 7/14/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/10/2014) (kgo)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER: On June 13, 2014, the parties filed a joint proposed pretrial schedule pursuant to the Court's May 28, 2014 Order and Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and 26(f). The Court hereby orders as follows: Except as specified by this Order or future orders of this Court, this action shall be governed by the Local Patent Rules of the Southern District of New York. The Court entered a Claim Construction Opinion & Order on August 23, 2013 in related actions that construed certain claim terms of U.S. Patent No. 6,488,963 (the "'963 Patent"). Those claim constructions of the '963 Patent shall apply in this action. A schedule for briefing of the claim preclusion and judicial estoppel issues is set forth herein. All evidence of record, including the trial transcript, designated deposition testimony and trial exhibits, admitted in Purdue v. Teva I and 13-Cv-4606 (SHS) ("Purdue v. Teva II") shall be deemed admitted into evidence for purposes of this action. The Parties agree that the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rules of the Court shall otherwise govern any discovery limitations on the Parties. For any discovery disputes that the Parties are unable to resolve in good faith, the movant may submit a three-page, single-spaced letter to the Court, and the non-moving party may submit a three-page, single-spaced letter to the Court within three business days. Following receipt of the response letter, the Court shall set a telephone hearing, if necessary, at the Court's convenience. The Court-entered Protective Orders in Purdue v. Teva I and Purdue v. Teva II are extended to protect confidential information in this case. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/23/2014) (kgo)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER: I hereby authorize the following attorney(s) to bring the General Purpose Computing Device(s) ("GPCD") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a trial or proceeding in the action entitled Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., et al., Nos. 13-4606 (SHS) and 13-3372 (SHS) which is scheduled to begin on July 14, 2014 and is anticipated to conclude by July 29, 2014. Brenton A. Elswick may bring in a mobile phone and a laptop. The attorney(s) identified in this Order must present a copy of this Order when entering the Courthouse. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/23/2014) (kgo)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 664 JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER: The parties have agreed that the case is to be tried without a jury. Defendants believe that their case in chief will consume approximately two and one half trial days, assuming reasonable cross-examination. Defendants expect to need approximately one full day for a rebuttal case on infringement, again assuming reasonable cross-examination. Thus, Defendants submit that the total trial time should be six and one half days, with three days allotted for the Plaintiffs and three and one half days allotted for the Defendants, per the parties respective requests; or seven days with each side receiving half of the trial time. If the Court sets trial of this action for a longer period of time, then Defendants expect that they will need one-half of any such additional time. If the Court wishes to hear brief opening statements, Defendants submit that each side be granted 30 minutes for opening statements. The parties have not consented to trial of the case by a magistrate judge. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/23/2014) (ft)
June 20, 2014 Filing 663 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
June 20, 2014 Filing 662 LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Rebecca R. Hermes dated June 20, 2014 re: the Court's June 17, 2014 Order directing the parties to show cause in writing by June 20, 2014 why the Joint Pretrial Order should not be filed publicly. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc..(Hermes, Rebecca)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER: The Court today "so ordered" the Joint Pretrial Order that will govern this trial commencing on July 14, 2014. The Court further orders as follows: 1. The Court expects the trial to last no more than six days, with time divided evenly between the two sides. Each trial day will last from approximately 9:30 a.m. to 4:30 p.m., with reasonable mid-morning, mid-afternoon, and lunch breaks. The Court will track the parties' use of their trial time. (JPTO p. 14-15.) 2. The Court will permit the plaintiffs and the defendants, collectively, to make brief opening presentations of up to thirty minutes each. (JPTO p. 14- 15.) 3. In regard to the competing proposals concerning the timing of calling live witnesses (JPTO p. 40), all questioning and cross-examination of a single witness should take place at one time. The Court does not anticipate the parties' need to question a single witness at separate points during the trial except for good cause shown. 4. With respect to the admissibility of deposition testimony from witnesses who will testify live at trial (JPTO p. 41), such testimony is admissible subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 32 and the Federal Rules of Evidence. 5. The parties are directed to show cause in writing by June 20, 2014 why the Joint Pretrial Order should not be publicly filed. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/17/2014) (kgo)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER: The following Order is subject to the definitions, obligations and restrictions imposed pursuant to Standing Order M10-468, as Revised. Upon submission of written application to this Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned Purdue Pharma L.P., et al v. Teva Pharms., USA, Inc., et al., Nos. 13cv4606 (SHS) and 13 cv 3372(SHS). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/16/2014) (ama)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 659 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (657 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Letter filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., (31 in 1:13-cv-03372-SHS) Letter filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, LLC, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., (60 in 1:13-cv-04606-SHS) Letter filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. We respectfully request permission to bring certain technology and documents into the courtroom for the duration of trial, set to begin on July 14, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/16/2014) (ama)
June 13, 2014 Filing 658 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
June 11, 2014 Filing 657 LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Rebecca R. Hermes dated June 11, 2014 re: permission to bring certain technology and documents into the courtroom. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hermes, Rebecca)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #655 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly L. Baxter terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (Stein, Sidney)
June 9, 2014 Filing 656 DECLARATION of Kelly L. Baxter in Support re: #655 MOTION for Kelly L. Baxter to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Goldman, Robert)
June 9, 2014 Filing 655 MOTION for Kelly L. Baxter to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Robert)
June 9, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Robert J. Goldman to RE-FILE Document #654 MOTION for Kelly L. Baxer to Withdraw as Attorney . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
June 9, 2014 Filing 654 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Kelly L. Baxer to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly L. Baxter, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Robert) Modified on 6/9/2014 (db).
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER: I hereby authorize the following attorney(s) to bring the General Purpose Computing Device(s) ("GPCD") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a trial or proceeding in the action entitled Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., et al., Nos. 13-4606 (SHS) and 13-3372 (SHS) which is scheduled to begin on July 14, 2014 and is anticipated to conclude by July 29, 2014. The attorney(s) identified in this Order must present a copy of this Order when entering the Courthouse. Their bringing of the equipment into the building constitutes a certification by them that the electronic device(s) lack (a) the capacity to make or record images or sounds or to send or receive wireless transmissions, and (b) one or more infrared ports or, alternatively, that any such capability or ports have been disabled. They shall not use or permit the use of such equipment to make or record images or sounds or to send or receive wireless transmissions. They shall comply in all respects with the requirements printed on the reverse side of this page. This order does not authorize any attorney or law firm to bring more than three GPCDs into the Courthouse unless its receipt has been acknowledged below by the Chair of the Court's Technology Committee. Mark D. Schuman, Todd S. Werner, Sarah M. Stensland, Jennell C. Bilek, Christpher A. Pinahs, Joseph M. Kaczrowski, Kenneth E. Crowell, David J. Novack, and Stuart D. Sender may all bring in a mobile phone and a laptop. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/4/2014) (kgo)
June 4, 2014 Filing 652 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (56 in 1:13-cv-04606-SHS) Letter, filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/4/2014) (kgo)
June 4, 2014 Filing 651 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Mark D. Schuman dated 5/30/2014 re: We are writing to request permission to bring certain technology and documents into the courtroom for the duration of trial. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/4/2014) (kgo)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The final pretrial conference scheduled for July 1, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. is adjourned sine die; 2. The trial of this action is adjourned to Monday, July 14, 2014, at 9:30 a.m.; and 3. All other dates in the Order filed on August 14, 2013, remain as set. (Bench Trial set for 7/14/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/29/2014) (kgo)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER: On April 29, 2014, defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ("Teva") moved to consolidate this action, filed April 3, with 13 Civ. 4606, which is currently scheduled to be tried on July 8. Plaintiffs oppose consolidation. For the reasons set forth herein the Court denies Teva's motion. The parties are directed to confer regarding the scope of discovery and submit to the Court by June 13 a proposed schedule leading to trial of this action in September or October 2014. If plaintiffs intend to raise their claim preclusion and judicial estoppel defenses in a pretrial motion, a schedule for such a motion should be part of that proposed schedule. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/28/2014) (ja)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 648 OPINION & ORDER 104374: The '888 and '060 patents will now proceed to trial. On the basis of the claim construction set forth herein, the Court will determine whether defendants' ANDAs infringe plaintiffs' patents and whether these patents are valid. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/27/2014) (kgo) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ca).
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER AMENDING FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND THE JUDGMENT IN THESE ACTIONS granting (153 in case no. 11cv2037) Motion to Amend/Correct: Accordingly, the Court grants Teva's motion. The January 14, 2014, Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law are amended by adding the following italicized language to page 108: "The following declaratory judgments shall enter in favor of Teva and against plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, and Grunenthal GmbH:... e. Claims 1, 2, 6, and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 7,776,314 are invalid." The January 22, 2014, Judgment is amended by adding the following italicized language to page 1: "The following declaratory judgment shall enter in favor of Teva and against plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals LP., Rhodes Technologies, and Grunenthal GmbH:... e. Claims 1, 2, 6, and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 7,776,314 are invalid." The January 22, 2014, Judgment is further amended by adding the following italicized language to page 2: "The following declaratory judgment is entered in favor of Teva and against plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, and Grunenthal GmbH:... e. Claims 1, 2, 6, and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 7,776,314 are invalid." (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/16/2014) ***Filed in 04md1603, 11cv2037 and 12cv5083. (tn)
March 17, 2014 Filing 646 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 3/7/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 17, 2014 Filing 645 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 3/7/2014 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Melissa Mormile, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2014.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Oral Argument on claim construction held on 3/7/2014 relating to cases 13 Civ. 3372 and 13 Civ. 4606. (lab)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER: I hereby authorize the following attorney(s) to bring the General Purpose Computing Device(s) ("GPCD") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a trial or proceeding in the action entitled Purdue Pharma L.P. v. Teva Pharms. USA, Inc., No. 13-cv-4606 which is anticipated to begin on March 7, 2014 and conclude on March 7, 2014: Robert Goldman - laptop computer; Rebecca Hermes - laptop computer with hard drive; and Rebecca Rabenstein - laptop computer with hard drive. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/4/2014) ***Filed in 04md1603 and 13cv4606. (tn)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER: I hereby authorize the following attorney(s) to bring the General Purpose Computing Device(s) ("GPCD") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a trial or proceeding in the action entitled Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., et al., Nos. 13-4606 (SHS) and 13-3372 (SHS) which is scheduled to begin on March 7, 2014 and is anticipated to conclude on March 7, 2014: Mark D. Schuman - laptop; and Kenneth Crowell - laptop. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/4/2014) ***Filed in 14md1603, 13cv4606 and 13cv3372. (tn)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Mark D. Schuman dated 3/4/2014 re: Counsel for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., requests permission to being electronic equipment into the courtroom for use during the Markman hearing. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/4/2014) ***Filed in 04md1603, 13cv4606 and 13cv3372. (tn)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER: that the hearing scheduled for Friday, March 7, at 10:00 a.m. is adjourned to 02:00 PM on that day, before Judge Sidney H. Stein. The Court will entertain argument from counsel at that time. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/4/2014) ***Filed in 04md1603, 13cv3372 and 13cv4606. (tn)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER: Because the Court found in Purdue Pharma L.P. et al. v. Teva Pharms., USA, Inc., Case Nos. 11 Civ. 2037 and 12 Civ. 5083, that the Low-ABUK Patents and the '314 Patent are invalid (see Case No. 04 Md. 1603, Dkt. No. 634), plaintiffs are precluded from arguing that those patents are valid in the above-captioned actions. The Court therefore directs that the above captioned actions be dismissed. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/29/2014) (ft)
January 27, 2014 Filing 639 LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Amy D. Brody dated 1/27/14 re: in Connection with Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause Submitted 1/24/14 and the Court's Letter Order of 1/14/14. Document filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:12-cv-02959-SHS(Brody, Amy)
January 24, 2014 Filing 638 RESPONSE re: #635 Order,, to Show Cause. Document filed by Grunenenthal GMBH, Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Goldman, Robert)
January 22, 2014 Filing 637 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, the Court Orders as follows: 1. Each of plaintiffs' requests for relief is denied. 2. The following declaratory judgments is entered in favor of Teva and against plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, and Grunenthal GmbH: a. Claims 3 and 19 of U.S. Patent No. 7,674,799 are invalid. b. Claims 30-34 and 76-79 of U.S. Patent No. 7,674,800 are invalid. c. Claims 1, 4, and 5 of U.S. Patent No. 7,683,072 are invalid. d. Teva's proposed products do not infringe claims 1, 2, 6, and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 7,776,314. 3. A further declaratory judgment is entered, in favor of Teva and against plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P. and Grunenthal GmbH, that claims 1, 2, 5, 7, and 8 of U.S. Patent No. 8,114,383 are invalid. 4. No attorneys fees will be awarded, because the prevailing party, Teva, has not demonstrated that this is an exceptional case (Filed in case 04 md 1603; 11 cv 2037; and 12 cv 5083). (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/22/14) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER granting (632) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (41) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 1:12-cv-02959-SHS. Discovery deadline is extended to January 31 solely to complete fact discovery of Noramco. Noramco is directed to produce a witness for deposition prior to Jan 31. Discovery due by 1/31/2014. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/14/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:12-cv-02959-SHS (lmb)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER: The Court today issued its Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in matters central to the above-captioned actions. The Court declared, inter alia, that three patents-in-suit in the above-captioned actions are invalid: U.S. Patent No. 7,674,799; U.S. Patent No. 7,647,800; and U.S. Patent No. 7,683,072 (collectively, "the Low-ABUK Patents"). In light of those declarations, plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions are hereby ordered to show cause on or before January 24, 2014, why they are not collaterally estopped from asserting the Low-ABUK Patents and why the Court should not dismiss all claims in these litigations that rely on the Low-ABUK Patents. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/14/2014) (lmb)
January 14, 2014 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #634 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (tro)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 634 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: Based on the findings of fact and conclusions of law articulated herein, the Court hereby ORDERED the following: 1. Each of plaintiffs' requests for relief is denied. 2. The following declaratory judgments shall enter in favor of Teva and against plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, and Grunenthal GmbH a. Claims 3 and 19 of U.S. Patent No. 7,674,799 are invalid. b. Claims 30-34 and 76-79 of U.S. Patent No. 7,674,800 are invalid. c. Claims 1, 4, and 5 of U.S. Patent No. 7,674,072 are invalid. d. Teva's proposed products do not infringe claims 1, 2, 6, and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 7,776,314. 3. A further declaratory judgment shall be entered, in favor of Teva and against plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P. and Grunenthal GmbH, that claims 1, 2, 5, 7, and 8 of U.S. Patent No. 8,114,383 are invalid. 4, No attorneys fees will be awarded, because the prevailing party, Teva, has not demonstrated that this is an exceptional case. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/14/2014) (tro)
January 8, 2014 Filing 633 STATUS REPORT. Joint Memorandum on the Status of Fact Discovery. Document filed by Purdue Pharma LP, Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Goldman, Robert)
January 8, 2014 Filing 632 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Amy D. Brody dated 1/8/14. Document filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:12-cv-02959-SHS(Brody, Amy)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 631 CONSENT JUDGMENT: it is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed as follows: Terms used in this Consent Judgment and not otherwise defined shall have the meanings ascribed thereto in the Settlement Agreement (the "Settlement Agreement") or theDistribution and Supply Agreement, as applicable, each dated as of January 5, 2014, by and among Purdue and Sandoz...This Consent Judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Action is hereby dismissed without costs or attorney's fees, save that this District Court shall retain jurisdiction over the Action, including without limitation, over implementation of, or disputes arising out of, this Consent Judgment or the settlement of the Action. A prevailing party shall be entitled to recover attorneys' fees in any such proceeding occurring after the entering of this Consent Judgment in which the case is found to be an exceptional one. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/8/2014) (mt)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 630 CONSENT JUDGMENT: it is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed as follows:Terms used in this Consent Judgment and not otherwise defined shall have themeanings ascribed thereto in the Settlement Agreement (the "Settlement Agreement") or the Distribution and Supply Agreement, as applicable, each dated as of January 5, 2014, by and among Purdue and Sandoz...This Consent Judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Actions are hereby dismissed without costs or attorney's fees, save thatthis District Court shall retain jurisdiction over the Actions, including without limitation, over implementation of, or disputes arising out of, this Consent Judgment or the settlement of the Actions. A prevailing party shall be entitled to recover attorneys' fees in any such proceeding occurring after the entering of this Consent Judgment in which the case is found to be an exceptional one. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/8/2014) (mt)
January 8, 2014 Filing 629 CONSENT JUDGMENT: Terms used in this Consent Judgment and not otherwise defined shall have the meanings ascribed thereto in the Settlement Agreement (the "Settlement Agreement") or the Distribution and Supply Agreement, as applicable, each dated as of January 5, 2014, by and among Purdue and Sandoz...This Consent Judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civi1 Procedure, and the Actions are hereby dismissed without costs or attorney's fees, save that this District Court shall retain jurisdiction over the Actions, including without limitation, over implementation of, or disputes arising out of, this Consent Judgment or the settlement of the Actions. A prevailing party shall be entitled to recover attorney's fees in any such proceeding occurring after the entering of this Consent Judgment in which the case is found to be an exceptional one. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/8/2014) (mt) Modified on 1/8/2014 (mt).
December 9, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 1/15/2014. (ft)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER: Plaintiffs have requested an extension of time for the filing of opening claim construction briefs until January 24, 2014. The Court denies this request. The parties are ordered to file their opening claim construction briefs by January 15, 2014, in all actions set for trial on July 8, 2014. Plaintiffs have requested an extension of fact discovery to January 17, 2014. The Court grants an extension of fact discovery to January 8, 2014, in all actions set for trial on July 8, 2014. Plaintiffs' letter asserts that several depositions noticed by defendants should not be taken because the fact witnesses have already been deposed in prior, related cases. Defendants respond that although the witnesses have been deposed before, the previous depositions were "taken in other OxyContin cases, which involved different patents or asserted one of the same patents against different defendants." (Warner Letter at 1.) The mere fact of a witness's prior deposition in a separate, albeit formally related, action does not foreclose a further deposition. Defendants may take these depositions, although the Court notes that the parties must avoid seeking duplicative discovery. Fact Discovery due by 1/8/2014. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/6/2013) (ft)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR BRYAN L. CLOBES TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. The Motion of NeighborCare Inc. for Bryan L. Clobes to Withdraw as Counsel of Record pursuant to Southern District of New York Local Civil Rule 1.4 is hereby GRANTED. granting #624 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bryan Lee Clobes terminated. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/25/2013) (rjm) Modified on 11/25/2013 (rjm).
November 22, 2013 Filing 626 LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Kevin E. Warner dated November 22, 2013 re: Letter from Robert J. Goldman dated November 19, 2013. Document filed by IMPAX Laboratories, Inc..(Warner, Kevin)
November 19, 2013 Filing 625 LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Robert J. Goldman dated November 19, 2013 re: Response to the Court's November 12, 2013 Order (MDL D.I. 623). Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goldman, Robert)
November 18, 2013 Filing 624 MOTION for Bryan L. Clobes to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Neighborcare, Inc..(Clobes, Bryan)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER. This Court has accepted the above-captioned case as related to other pending litigation pursuant to Rule 13 of this District's Rules for the Division of Business Among District Judges. In order to secure the advantages of judicial economy for which Rule 13 exists, the Court will treat this case as consolidated for trial with the following cases: 12 Civ. 2959, 13 Civ. 683, 13 Civ. 763, 13 Civ. 3372, 13 Civ. 3374, and 13 Civ. 4606. Accordingly, this case will be tried starting on July 8, 2014. The parties shall adhere to the Court's discovery order of September 20, 2013 (No. 04 Md. 1603, Dkt. 592). For any deadlines prior to January 6, 2014, in that order, the parties in this action may jointly decide on a substitute schedule. However, no deadline-including the deadline for the completion of fact discovery-shall extend beyond January 6, 2014. On or before January 6, 2014, the parties in this action shall submit to the Court a joint memorandum, updating the Court as to the status of discovery and confirming that fact discovery is complete. The Court orders all of the foregoing, subject to the parties' feedback. Any party may file an objection to this order on or before November 19, 2013. If a further pleading or counterclaim prompts a party to object to this order, it must file its objection within five business days after receiving notice of that pleading or counterclaim. I any party files an objection, any response will be due within three business days thereafter. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/12/2013) (rjm)
October 29, 2013 Filing 622 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 10/15/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 621 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 10/15/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 620 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 10/10/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 619 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 10/10/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 618 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 10/9/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 617 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 10/9/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 616 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 10/8/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 615 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 10/8/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 614 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 10/7/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 613 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 10/7/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 612 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 10/2/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 611 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 10/2/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 610 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 10/1/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 609 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 10/1/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 608 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 9/30/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 607 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 9/30/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 606 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 9/26/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 605 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 9/26/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 604 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 9/25/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 603 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 9/25/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 602 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 9/24/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 601 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 9/24/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 600 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 9/23/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2013 Filing 599 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 9/23/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR KAREN R. POPPEL TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD: granting #597 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The withdrawal of the appearance of Karen R. Poppel as counsel of record for Defendant-Intervenor Noramco, Inc. pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of thisCourt, is hereby GRANTED. Attorney Karen Riesen Poppel terminated. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/25/2013) (djc)
October 25, 2013 Filing 597 MOTION for Karen R. Poppel to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Noramco Inc..(Verrecchio, Angela)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER. The trial of these actions having been completed on October 15, 2013, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Each side's post trial brief for the issues on which it bears the burden of proof is due on or before November 6, 2013, and shall not exceed 45 pages; 2. Responding briefs are due on or before November 20, 2013, and shall not exceed 45 pages; 3. Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law are due on or before November 27, 2013; and 4. Reply briefs are due on or before November 27, 2013, and shall not exceed 20 pages. (Reply to Response to Brief due by 11/27/2013. Responses to Brief due by 11/20/2013.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/16/2013) (rjm) Modified on 10/17/2013 (rjm).
October 15, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial completed on 10/15/2013. All parties present. Plaintiffs rebuttal case begins. Plaintiffs rest. Trial concluded. Post trial briefing schedule set. See Order dated October 16, 2013. (mro)
October 10, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 10/10/2013. All parties present. All defendants rest on all issues. (mro)
October 9, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 10/9/2013. All parties present. Defendants opening statements regarding the low ABUK patents held. Trial continued. (mro)
October 8, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 10/8/2013. All parties present. Purdue rests with respect to the abuse-proof patents. Defendants move for directed verdict of non-infringement of 963, 314, and 383 patents and of invalidity of the 314 patent for indefiniteness. Plaintiffs oppose the motion. The Court will take the motion under consideration. Plaintiffs opening regarding the low ABUK patents held. Trial continued. (mro)
October 7, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 10/7/2013. All parties present. Trial continued. Defendants rest. Plaintiffs begin their rebuttal case. (mro)
October 2, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 10/2/2013. Trial will resume on Monday, October 7, 2013. (cd)
October 1, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 10/1/2013. (cd)
September 30, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 9/30/2013. All parties present. Trial continued. (mro)
September 26, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 9/26/2013. All parties present. Trial continued until Monday, September 30, 2013. (mro)
September 25, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 9/25/2013. All parties present. Trial continued. (mro)
September 24, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial held on 9/24/2013. All parties present. Trial continued. (mro)
September 24, 2013 Filing 595 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., GRUNENTHAL GMBH AND PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. settling action between them. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/24/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml)
September 24, 2013 Filing 594 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM, GRUNENTHAL GMBH AND PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. settling action between them. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/24/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml)
September 24, 2013 Filing 593 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., GRUNENTHAL GMBH AND PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. settling action between them. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/24/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml)
September 23, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Bench Trial begun on 9/23/2013. See attached for list of appearances. All parties present. Opening for both sides. Plaintiff begins its case. (mro)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER:The Parties, by agreement, will exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. on the date indicated below. Except as specified by this Order or future orders of this Court, these actions shall be governed by the Local Patent Rules of the Southern District of New York. Any construction of claim terms construed by the Court regarding U.S. Patent No. 8,114,383 shall apply to claim terms as further set forth in this Order. The Parties shall serve infringement and invalidity contentions pursuant to the schedule set forth below. The Parties shall supplement these contentions by the close of expert discovery and pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(e) and Local Patent Rule 9. Opinions of counsel shall be disclosed pursuant to Local Patent Rule 10 as set forth in the schedule below. Exchange initial disclosures due by 8/30/2013; Defendants must produce any and all updates to their ANDAs due by 9/9/2013; Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2013; Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2013; Fact discovery stayed in light of trial on lead related cases due by 9/10-10/15/2013; Plaintiffs will serve Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions pursuant to Local Patent Rule 6 by 10/18/2013; Earliest date on which Contention Interrogatories may be served is 10/18/2013; Defendants will serve Invalidity Contentions pursuant to Local Patent Rule 7 by 12/2/2013; Parties will file a joint Disputed Claim Terms Chart pursuant to Local Patent Rule 11 by 12/16/2013; Fact Discovery due by 12/20/2013; Parties will serve Opening Claim Construction Briefs by 1/15/2014; Parties will serve Rebuttal Claim Construction Briefs by 12/14/2014; Exchange of Expert Reports on Issues for which the Party Bears the Burden of Proof (with Claim Charts) by 12/14/2014; Claim Construction Hearing on 3/7/2013; Last day to produce all opinions-of-counsel and related documents pursuant to Local Patent Rule 10 due by 30 days after the Court's claim construction ruling; Exchange of Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 3/21/2014; Exchange of Reply Expert Reports due by 4/18/2014; Expert Discovery due by 5/16/2014; Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 6/13/2014; Opening Motions in Limine due by 6/20/2014; Rebuttal to motions in limine due by 7/8/2014; Final Pretrial Conference on 7/1/2014; Ready for Trial by 7/8/2014. Documents produced in previous oxycodone cases to any Party will be treated as if produced in the instant litigations to that same Party. A Party that received a previous document production may rely on and use that previous document production as if it were obtained or provided in the instant litigations. Documents from prior related litigations involving any of the ORF patents will be treated as if produced in the instant litigations, and as further set forth in this Order. Interrogatory responses from prior related litigations involving any of the ORF patents will be treated as if produced in the instant litigations, and as further set forth in this Order. Responses to requests for admission from prior related litigations involving any of the ORF patents will be treated as if produced in the instant litigations, and as further set forth in this Order. The Parties shall make a good faith effort to avoid seeking duplicative or cumulative fact deposition testimony. Deposition testimony from prior related litigations involving any of the ORF patents will be treated as if produced in the instant litigations, and as further set forth in this Order. The Court-entered Protective Orders in 11-cv-02037-SHS, 11-cv-02038-SHS, 11-cv-02400-SHS, and 11-cv-08153-SHS are extended to protect confidential information in the above-captioned ORF litigations. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/20/2013) (tn)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER: On August 23, 2013, this Court issued a Claim Construction Opinion and Order in the above-captioned litigation, construing the relevant terms of the patents-in-suit. The Claim Construction Opinion and Order delineates the factual disputes on which the parties will offer their proofs in the trial commencing September 23, 2013. Promptly after the Court issued that Opinion and Order, two of Plaintiffs' expert witnesses supplemented their earlier expert reports with reports dated September 3 and September 4, 2013. Those brief reports supplemented the experts' disclosures of their expected testimony in order to reflect the newly-construed claim language. Defendants have moved to strike the reports as untimely. As they point out, the appointed time for expert reports had long passed by the time Plaintiffs' experts submitted these supplements. But given all parties' ongoing obligation to update their disclosures, these supplements appropriately and promptly updated earlier reports in light of the Claim Construction Opinion and Order. The Court therefore denies Defendants' motion. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/17/2013) (ja)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER: In anticipation of the trial commencing September 23, 2013, the parties in the above-captioned matters have filed several motions in limine. The Court hereby orders as follows: 1. Plaintiffs have moved to preclude evidence of a 2007 plea agreement. The evidence relates to conduct occurring at least nine years before the launch of Reformulated OxyContin and is of marginal relevance to any question of fact in this trial... 2. Plaintiffs have moved to preclude testimony of four late-disclosed fact witnesses as set forth herein... The Court therefore grants Plaintiffs' motion to preclude the testimony of Mr. Stewart, Ms. Anselmo, Dr. Cooper, and Dr. Lee. 3. Defendants have moved to preclude Plaintiffs from asserting that Defendants have infringed the '383 Patent under the Doctrine of Equivalents... The Court denies the motion to preclude Plaintiffs from asserting that Defendants have infringed the '383 Patent under the Doctrine of Equivalents. 4. Defendants have moved to preclude Plaintiffs' proposed expert Dr. Bigio from testifying concerning breaking strength. The Court denies Defendants' motion, relying on Plaintiffs' assertion that "Dr. Bigio has not and will not offer any opinions regarding the meaning of the term 'breaking strength'... 5. Defendants have moved to preclude Plaintiffs' proposed expert Dr. Hausman from testifying that the abuse-proof patents are commercially successful... The Court denies the motion to preclude Dr. Hausman from testifying that the abuse-proof patents are commercially successful. 6. Defendants have moved to preclude Plaintiffs from claiming an invention date before June 26, 1996 for the '963 Patent..., renders the motion moot. 7. Defendants Teva and Impax have moved to preclude Plaintiffs from offering evidence relating to Noramco's U.S. Patent No. 7,906,647 as evidence of infringement... Accordingly, the Court denies Teva's and Impax's motion to preclude evidence of Noramco's patent as evident of infringement; 8. Defendants Teva and Impax have moved to preclude Plaintiffs from offering expert testimony not disclosed in expert reports or through deposition, and Plaintiffs do not oppose that motion in principle. The Court grants this motion insofar as the same rule applies to all expert witnesses pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2). 9. Defendant Sandoz has moved for a determination that its proposed trial exhibit DTX-4097 is not privileged... The Court denies the motion in limine. (See Order). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/17/2013) (ja) Modified on 9/20/2013 (ja).
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER re: #568 Claim Construction Opinion and Order: On August 23, 2013, this Court issued a Claim Construction Opinion and Order in the above-captioned litigation, construing the relevant terms of the patents-in-suit. The Claim Construction Opinion and Order delineates the factual disputes on which the parties will offer their proofs in the trial commencing September 23, 2013. Promptly after the Court issued that Opinion and Order, two of Plaintiffs' expert witnesses supplemented their earlier expert reports with reports dated September 3 and September 4, 2013. Those brief reports supplemented the experts' disclosures of their expected testimony in order to reflect the newly-construed claim language. Defendants have moved to strike the reports as untimely. As they point out, the appointed time for expert reports had long passed by the time Plaintiffs' experts submitted these supplements. But given all parties' ongoing obligation to update their disclosures, these supplements appropriately and promptly updated earlier reports in light of the Claim Construction Opinion and Order. The Court therefore denies Defendants' motion. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/17/2013) (ja)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein, from Terrence J. Connolly, dated 9/16/2013, re: on behalf of all defendants as set forth herein, request permission to bring certain technology into the courtroom for the duration of trial, set to begin on September 23, 2013, including Internet service and electronic equipment; and we request permission for the following additional computer technology as further set forth herein. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/17/2013) (ja)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER: I hereby authorize the following attorney(s) to bring the General Purpose Computing Device(s) ("GPCD") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a trial or proceeding in the action entitled Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., et al., Nos. 11cv2037 (SHS), and 11cv2400 (SHS), which is scheduled to begin on September 23, 2013 and is anticipated to conclude on October 18, 2013. Attorney(s) Barbara Mullin: Laptop; Tablet, Angela Verrecchio: Laptop; Tablet, Matthew Pearson: Laptop; Tablet, Steven Maslowski: Laptop; Tablet; and Karen Poppel: Laptop; Tablet. The attorney(s) identified in this Order must present a copy of this Order when entering the Courthouse... (See Order). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/17/2013) (ja)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER: I hereby authorize the following attorney(s) to bring the General Purpose Computing Device(s) ("GPCD") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a trial or proceeding in the action entitled Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., et al., Nos. 11md1603 (SHS), 11cv02038 (SHS), 12cv5615 (SHS), 11cv4694 (SHS) which is scheduled to begin on September 23, 2013 and is anticipated to conclude on October 18, 2013. Attorney(s) Mark D. Schuman: Laptop, Todd S. Werner: Laptop, and Jennell C. Bilek: Laptop. The attorney(s) identified in this Order must present a copy of this Order when entering the Courthouse... (See Order). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/17/2013) (ja)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER: I hereby authorize the following attorney(s) to bring the General Purpose Computing Device(s) ("GPCD") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a trial or proceeding in the action entitled In re: OxyContin Antitrust Litigation, No. 04-md-1603 SHS, which is anticipated to begin on Sept. 23, 2013 and conclude on Oct. 18, 2013. Pablo Hendler, Ropes & Gray - Laptop Computer; Sona De, Ropes & Gray - Laptop Computer; Chris Harnett, Ropes & Gray - Laptop Computer; Kelly Baxter, Ropes & Gray - Laptop Computer; Rebecca Hermes, Ropes & Gray - Laptop Computer; Vikram Mathrani, Ropes & Gray - Laptop Computer; Basil Lewris, Finnegan - Laptop Computer; Jennifer Roscetti, Finnegan - Laptop Computer; Erin Sommers, Finnegan - Laptop Computer. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/16/2013) (ft)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER: I hereby authorize Courtroom Connect, a Southern District of New York contracted vendor, to provide at least Purdue Pharma LP., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Board of Regents of The University of Texas, and Grunenthal GmbH with Internet connectivity for the duration of the trial in the action entitled In re: OxyContin Antitrust Litigation, 04 Md. 1603 (SHS), relating to the following cases listed herein. The trial is scheduled to begin on September 23, 2013 and is anticipated to conclude before October 18, 2013. Courtroom Connect may proceed to make proper arrangements with the Court's Office of the District Executive and may have access to the courtroom on Friday, September 20, 2013 in order to set up the Internet connection. The Court's Courtroom Technology office is also allowed to have access to the courtroom on Friday, September 20, 2013 to set up audio/visual equipment for use by all parties during the trial. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/16/2013) (ft)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER: I hereby authorize the following attorney(s) to bring the General Purpose Computing Device(s) ("GPCD") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a trial or proceeding in the action entitled Purdue Pharma L.P., et al., v. Impax Laboratories, Inc., et al., No. 11-cv-2400, which is anticipated to begin on September 23, 2013 and conclude on October 18, 2013. Scott R. Samay - Laptop, Tablet; Anna Lamut - Laptop, Tablet; George Lombardi - Laptop, Tablet; Maureen Rurka - Laptop, Tablet; Kevin E. Warner - Laptop, Tablet; Katherine Rohlf - Laptop, Tablet. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/16/2013) Filed in associated case 11-cv-2400 (SHS). (ft)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 582 SUPPLEMENT TO JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER RELATING TO RANBAXY ET AL. TRIAL RECORD: Pursuant to the Court's August 28, 2013 Order (1:04-md-1603-SHS D.I. 570), plaintiffs and counterclaim defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies (collectively "Purdue") (collectively "Plaintiffs") and defendants and counterclaim plaintiffs Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. ("Par"), Sandoz Inc.("Sandoz"), Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ("Teva"), and Impax Laboratories, Inc. ("Impax") (collectively "Defendants") submit for approval by the Court this Proposed Supplement to the Joint Pretrial Order. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/13/2013) (ama)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER: The Court today "so ordered" the parties' "Supplement to Joint Pretrial Order Relating to Ranbaxy et al. Trial Record" ("Supp. PTO"),which will govern this trial commencing September 23, 2013. The Court further orders as follows: The parties disagree about the proper scope of Dr. Gary Molander's testimony as an expert witness for Defendants Sandoz, Teva, and Impax. The Court agrees with those Defendants' proposal and will allow them to examine Dr. Molander with respect to the validity of the low-ABUK patents, limited to "new and necessary" testimony (see Supp. PTO at 3-4), rather than his simply restating opinions offered by Dr. Wolf in the Ranbaxy trial. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/13/2013) (ama)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 580 IN THE MATTER OF AN APPLICATION TO BRING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE(S) INTO THE COURTHOUSES OF THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR USE IN A TRIAL OR PROCEEDING. I hereby authorize the attorney(s) as specified in this Order to bring the General Purpose Computing Device(s) ("GPCD") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a trial or proceeding in the action entitled Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., et al., Nos. 04md01603 (SHS), 11cv2038 (SHS), 12cv05615 (SHS), which is scheduled to begin on September 23, 2013 and is anticipated to conclude on October 18, 2013, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/13/2013) (rjm)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. The motion of Thomas A. Wang, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/10/2013) (rjm)
September 10, 2013 Filing 578 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. The motion of Rebecca R. Hermes, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/10/2013) (rjm)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. The motion of Kelly L. Baxter, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/10/2013) (rjm)
September 10, 2013 Filing 575 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 10, 2013 Filing 574 STIPULATION. Plaintiffs and Defendants, by their undersigned counsel hereby STIPULATE as follows: 1. Plaintiffs will not assert at any trial of the above-captioned cases an invention date for the claims of U.S. Patent No. 6,488,963 Patent that is earlier than June 26, 1996; 2. Plaintiffs stipulate that European Patent Application 0 661 045 ("the EP '045 Publication") was published and publicly available no later than July 5, 1995, and is prior art to the claims of the '963 Patent under 35 U.S.C. 102(a); 3. and Plaintiffs will not dispute that the EP '045 Publication is prior art to the '963 Patent at trial. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/9/2013) (rjm)
August 30, 2013 Filing 573 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 572 JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER. Pursuant to the Court's Individual Practices 3.A., plaintiffs and counterclaim defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies (collectively "Purdue"), Board of Regents of the University of Texas System ("University of Texas"), and Grunenthal GmbH ("Grunenthal") (collectively "Plaintiffs") and defendants and counterclaim plaintiffs Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. ("Par"), Sandoz Inc. ("Sandoz"), Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ("Teva"), and Impax Laboratories, Inc. ("Impax") (collectively "Defendants") submit for approval by the Court this Joint Pretrial Order. The parties have agreed that the case is to be tried without a jury. Defendants anticipate that six (6) to seven (7) trial days will be necessary for their case-in-chief and rebuttal case. The parties have not consented to trial of the case by a magistrate judge. The Court may, in order to prevent manifest injustice or for good cause shown, at the trial of the action or prior thereto upon application of counsel for Plaintiffs and/or Defendants, made in good faith, or upon the motion of the Court, modify this Joint Pretrial Order upon such conditions as the Court may deem just and proper, and as further set forth. Exhibits filed in hard copy only. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/28/2013) (rjm) Modified on 8/29/2013 (rjm).
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER: The Court is informed that the parties are confused as to whether all pretrial materials are due by September 6, 2013 (see Order dated March 12, 2013) or September 13, 2013 (see Order dated August 9, 2013). For the sake of simplicity, the Court directs that all pretrial submissions shall be submitted on or before September 13, 2013. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/28/2013) (lmb)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER: The Court has today so ordered the Joint Pretrial Order that will govern this trial commencing on September 23, 2013. On pages 22 and 23 of that pretrial order the parties state they are currently trying to reach agreement on a proposal to the Court on the issue of how to treat the trial record for the Ranbaxy trial and the extent to which the Court will permit supplementation in regard to the validity of the ABUK patents. The parties are directed to submit their proposal to the Court in that regard on or before September 6, 2013. The Court presumes the entire Ranbaxy trial record will be part of the record of the September 23 trial, with the supplementation the parties will attempt to agree upon. In regard to the competing proposals concerning advance notice of trial witnesses (JPTO p. 25), the Court adopts plaintiffs' proposal with the addition that plaintiffs give notice of their first two witnesses by 8:00 p.m. on September 17, 2013. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/28/2013) (lmb)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 569 PROTECTIVE ORDER... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... This protective order may be modified for good cause shown. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/23/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:12-cv-02959-SHS (rjm)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 568 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINION AND ORDER. #103513 These patents, as further specified in this Claim Construction Opinion and Order, will now proceed to trial. On the basis of the claim construction set forth above, the Court will determine whether defendants' ANDAs infringe the Abuse-Proof and Low-ABUK Patents and whether these patents are valid. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/23/2013) (rjm) Modified on 8/27/2013 (ca).
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER: On May 31, 2013, the parties in the above-captioned actions filed a joint proposed discovery plan pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court hereby orders as follows: As set forth herein.( Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2013., Expert Discovery due by 5/16/2014., Fact Discovery due by 12/20/2013., Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2013., Motions due by 6/20/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/13/2014., Ready for Trial by 7/8/2014.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/14/2013) (ama) Modified on 8/16/2013 (tro).
August 12, 2013 Filing 566 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a corrected argument proceeding held on 7/15/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 12, 2013 Filing 565 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: corrected argument held on 7/15/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2013.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER. In an amended scheduling order dated March 12, 2013, plaintiffs and numerous defendants stipulated, and this Court ordered, that 12 actions in this consolidated litigation would be ready for trial on September 23, 2013. See, e.g., Dkt. No. 29, No. 12 Civ. 897. At a pretrial conference on May 7, 2013, the Court ordered that it would hold a trial in six of those actions, involving two defendants: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Sandoz Inc. At the May 7 conference, and again by letter following that conference, defendants Impax Laboratories, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. informed the Court that they too wished to participate in the September 2013 trial. The Court now grants these requests. Therefore, it is hereby ordered that trial is set for September 23, 2013, at 9:30 a.m., in the following actions: Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Impax Laboratories, Inc., No. 11 Civ. 2400; Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Nos. 11 Civ. 2038 and 12 Civ. 5615; Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Sandoz Inc., Nos. 11 Civ. 4694, 12 Civ. 897, 12 Civ. 5082, and 12 Civ. 7582; and Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Nos. 11 Civ. 2037 and 12 Civ. 5083. The parties shall jointly file all pretrial materials required by the Court's individual practices by September 13, 2013. (Bench Trial set for 9/23/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/9/2013) (rjm)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 563 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.'S AND MYLAN INC.'S FILING OF AN AMENDED ANSWER. On September 5, 2012, this Court granted Actavis leave to amend its Answer and Counterclaims in the Ranbaxy Action. (D.I. 160, Ranbaxy Action). In view of that Order, and the Court's corresponding Orders in Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., 11-cv-2038-SHS (S.D.N.Y.) (D.I. 65); Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. IMPAX Laboratories, Inc., 11-cv-2400-SHS (S.D.N.Y.) (D.I. 63); Purdue Pharma LP., et al. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., 11-cv-2037-SHS (S.D.N.Y.) (D.I. 74); Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, 11-cv-8153-SHS (S.D.N. Y.) (D.I. 54); and Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Watson Laboratories, Inc. - Florida et al., 11-cv-2036-SHS (S.D.N.Y.) (D.I. 50), Plaintiffs will not oppose Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s and Mylan Inc.'s filing of an Amended Answer to include the defense of collateral estoppel. Having considered the foregoing stipulation, the Court hereby grants Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mylan Inc. leave to file their Amended Answer. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:12-cv-02959-SHS (rjm)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall submit to the Court by August 16, 2013, a proposed schedule for these actions, including a joint discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). The proposed schedule shall also include a briefing schedule and proposed date for a Markman hearing, as well as a proposed trial date. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/30/2013) (rjm)
July 19, 2013 Filing 561 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/15/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
July 19, 2013 Filing 560 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 7/15/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 559 OPINION & ORDER #1034701. For the reasons set forth above, Purdue's actions for infringement and defendants' declaratory judgment counterclaims for non-infringement are moot. The Court presumes that defendants' declaratory judgment counterclaims for invalidity are not moot, but the Court nonetheless declines to exercise jurisdiction over those claims. These actions are hereby dismissed. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(lmb) Modified on 7/26/2013 (sdi).
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER. I hereby authorize the following attomey(s) to bring the General Purpose Computing Device(s) ("GPCD") listed in this order into the Courthouse for use in a trial or proceeding in the action entitled In Re: Oxycontin Antitrust Litigation, No. 04 Md. 1603 SHS, which is anticipated to begin on July 15, 2013 and conclude on July 16th, 2013. Sarah Prutzman, Morrison & Foerster, LP, Terrence Connolly, Latham & Watkins LLP, Kevin Warner, Winston & Strawn LLP, Scott Samay, Winston & Strawn LLP, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/15/2013) (rjm) Modified on 7/15/2013 (rjm).
July 15, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Claim Construction Hearing held on 7/15/2013. (lab)
May 31, 2013 Filing 557 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/7/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 31, 2013 Filing 556 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/7/2013 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/24/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 22, 2013 Filing 555 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: (551 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 278 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS) Order,,, /Memorandum of Defendant Mylan in Response to Court's May 8, 2013 Order Concerning Potential Dismissal of the Original Formulation Action as Moot. Document filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Clayton, Natalie)
May 16, 2013 Filing 554 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., AND RHODES TECHNOLOGIES AND VARAM, INC. AND KVK-TECH, INC. Settling action. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/16/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(dt)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER: On July 15, 2013, at 9:30 a.m., the Court will hold a Markman hearing to construe the claims at issue in the patents listed herein. The Markman hearing will not address U.S. Patent No. 8,309,060, the only other patent currently at issue in the above-listed actions, nor will that patent be a subject of the September 2013 trial. The parties shall submit facts and legal argument to the Court in the following manner: a) By June 14, 2013: i. Plaintiffs shall file a single Joint Disputed Claim Terms Chart listing the disputed claim terms and phrases, including each party's proposed construction. ii. Plaintiffs shall submit a single opening claim construction brief, not to exceed 50 pages, and all supporting evidence and testimony. iii. Defendants PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Sandoz Inc. (collectively, "Lead Case Defendants") shall submit a single opening claim construction brief, not to exceed 50 pages, and all supporting evidence and testimony. Lead Case Defendants shall coordinate their efforts with all other defendants who wish to participate and Lead Case Defendants' brief shall be signed by all other defendants who join its arguments. iv. Any party wishing to submit argument, evidence, or testimony to the Court not reflected in plaintiffs' or Lead Case Defendants' briefs may submit a brief, not to exceed 5 pages, and any supporting evidence and testimony. b) By July 3, 2013: i. Plaintiffs shall submit a single responsive claim construction brief, not to exceed 30 pages, and all supporting evidence and testimony. ii. Lead Case Defendants shall submit a single responsive claim construction brief not to exceed 30 pages, and all supporting evidence and testimony. Lead Case Defendants shall coordinate their efforts with all other defendants who wish to participate and Lead Case Defendants' brief shall be signed by all other defendants who join its arguments. iii. Any party wishing to submit argument, evidence, or testimony to the Court not reflected in plaintiffs' or Lead Case Defendants' responsive briefs may submit a brief, not to exceed 5 pages, and any supporting evidence and testimony. ( Markman Hearing set for 7/15/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/8/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(mro)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the parties shall submit to the Court by May 31, 2013, a proposed schedule for these actions, including a joint discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). The proposed schedule shall also include a briefing schedule and proposed date for a Markman hearing, as well as a proposed trial date. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/8/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:12-cv-02959-SHS(mro)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER: Defendants Impax Laboratories, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Mylan Inc. are hereby ordered to show cause as to why these actions should not be dismissed as moot in light of the U.S. Food and Drug Administration's determination that OxyContin extended-release tablets approved under NDA 20-553 were withdrawn from sale for reasons of safety or effectiveness and that the FDA will not accept or approve ANDAs that refer to these drug products. 78 Fed. Reg. 23,273 (Apr. 18, 2013). Defendants shall submit to the Court a single joint memorandum of law, not to exceed 25 pages, by May 22, 2013. Plaintiffs shall submit a single joint memorandum of law, not to exceed 25 pages, by June 5, 2013. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/8/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(mro)
May 7, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: status conference held on 5/7/2013. (lab)
May 1, 2013 Filing 550 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., AND PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P. AND WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-FLORIDA, AND ANDRX LABS, LLC Settling action. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/1/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice o fRight to Appeal)(dt)
May 1, 2013 Filing 549 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWENN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., GRUNENTHAL GMBH AND WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-FLORIDA, AND ANDRX LABS, LLC Settling action. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/1/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt)
May 1, 2013 Filing 548 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., AND GRUNENTHAL GMBH AND WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-FLORIDA Settlin Action. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/1/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:12-cv-03111-SHS(dt)
May 1, 2013 Filing 547 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PPHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM, AND GRUNENTHAL GMBH AND WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-FLORIDA, AND ANDRX LABS, LLC Settling Action. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/1/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt)
May 1, 2013 Filing 546 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., AND RHODES TECHNOLOGIES AND ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC Settling action. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/1/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(dt)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to close these two actions in accordance with the Consent Judgment filed on January 8, 2013 [doc. no. 98 in 11 Civ. 2401; doc. no. 99 in 11 Civ. 7104]. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/29/2013) (mro)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER: A pretrial status conference in the above matters is set for May 7, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. The parties in each action are directed to confer in advance of that conference in regard to: 1) the schedule for the remainder of each action, including the actions filed in 2013; 2) the effect, if any, on each action of the recent FDA determination concerning NDA 20-553,78 Fed. Reg. 23,273 (Apr. 18, 2013); and 3) the selection of an action to have a Markman hearing in June or July and a trial in September. ( Status Conference set for 5/7/2013 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/19/2013) (mro)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 543 OPINION AND ORDER: #103116 denying (510) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:10-cv-06038-SHS; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:11-cv-00766-SHS; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:12-cv-02814-SHS; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:12-cv-06047-SHS. Varams meager motion fails to overturn the extensive, considered opinions crafted by this Court and the Federal Circuit over the past decade. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on the '042 patent is denied. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(ama) Modified on 4/16/2013 (ama). Modified on 4/18/2013 (jab).
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 542 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Defendants Varam, Inc. and KVK-Tech, Inc. have moved for summary judgment against plaintiffs in four related Hatch-Waxman Act actions that concern, in part, U.S. Patent No. 5,508,042 (the "042 patent"). Accordingly, Varam's motion for sanctions as to its motion for summary judgment on the '042 patent is denied. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(mro)
February 20, 2013 Filing 541 DECLARATION of Michle R. Steiner in Support re: (533 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 112 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 113 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 95 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 118 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION to Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs Consolidated Summary Judgment Opposition Submission.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
February 20, 2013 Filing 540 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (533 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 112 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 95 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 113 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 118 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION to Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs Consolidated Summary Judgment Opposition Submission.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
February 15, 2013 Filing 539 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
February 15, 2013 Filing 538 DECLARATION of Rebecca R. Hermes in Opposition re: (533 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 112 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 113 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 95 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 118 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION to Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs Consolidated Summary Judgment Opposition Submission.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Harnett, Christopher)
February 15, 2013 Filing 537 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (533 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 112 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 95 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 113 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 118 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION to Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs Consolidated Summary Judgment Opposition Submission.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Harnett, Christopher)
February 14, 2013 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (117 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS) Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(ja)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., and Rhodes Technologies' letter Motion to File Under Seal dated the 14th of February 2013, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following documents: Confidential Exhibits to the Declaration of Rebecca R. Hermes In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant Varam's February 8, 2013 Motion to Strike shall be filed by the Clerk of the Court under seal, and shall remain filed under seal until further order of this Court. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(ja)
February 8, 2013 Filing 535 DECLARATION of Michle R. Steiner in Support re: (533 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 112 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 113 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 95 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 118 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION to Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs Consolidated Summary Judgment Opposition Submission.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
February 8, 2013 Filing 534 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (533 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 112 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 95 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 113 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 118 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION to Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs Consolidated Summary Judgment Opposition Submission.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
February 8, 2013 Filing 533 MOTION to Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs Consolidated Summary Judgment Opposition Submission. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
February 8, 2013 Filing 532 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (514 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 102 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 80 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 98 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 97 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement And Invalidity Of The Chapman Patents.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 36, #7 Exhibit 37, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 40, #11 Exhibit 41)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
February 8, 2013 Filing 531 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (80 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 514 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 98 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 102 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 97 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement And Invalidity Of The Chapman Patents.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
February 8, 2013 Filing 530 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (94 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 76 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 93 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 98 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 510 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity And Non-Infringement Of The 042 Patent.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
February 8, 2013 Filing 529 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (94 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 76 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 93 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 98 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 510 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity And Non-Infringement Of The 042 Patent.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Seal Portions of Certain Trial Exhibits (No. 10 Civ. 3734, Dkt. No. 267) is hereby granted, and the following trial exhibits are hereby sealed: PTX 304, PTX 305, PTX 306, and PTX 308. The redacted versions of these exhibits, attached to plaintiffs' memorandum of law in support of this motion (No. 10 Civ. 3734, Dkt. No. 268) shall be publicly available. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(js)
February 4, 2013 REMARK: Opinion and Order: CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of Kentucky, County of Pike. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via Federal Express AIRBILL_ 8017-4734-1563. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(js)
January 25, 2013 Filing 527 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
January 25, 2013 Filing 526 DECLARATION of Rebecca R. Hermes in Opposition re: (514 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 80 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 98 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 97 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 102 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement And Invalidity Of The Chapman Patents., (76 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 93 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 510 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 94 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 98 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity And Non-Infringement Of The 042 Patent.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19 (1of 2), #20 Exhibit 19 (2 of 2), #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Harnett, Christopher)
January 25, 2013 Filing 525 COUNTER STATEMENT TO (99 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 100 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 104 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 516 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 82 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Harnett, Christopher)
January 25, 2013 Filing 524 COUNTER STATEMENT TO (512 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 95 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 78 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 96 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 100 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Harnett, Christopher)
January 25, 2013 Filing 523 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (80 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 514 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 98 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 102 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 97 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement And Invalidity Of The Chapman Patents., (94 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 76 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 93 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 98 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 510 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity And Non-Infringement Of The 042 Patent. [Public Version]. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Harnett, Christopher)
January 24, 2013 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (102 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS) Order, (103 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS) Order,, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(ama)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following documents: As set forth herein shall be filed by the Clerk of the Court under seal, and shall remain filed under seal until further order of this Court (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/24/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(ama)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 521 STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC FOR ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC AS THE DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF IN THIS ACTION: Par is hereby substituted in place of Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Actavis Elizabeth LLC in the above-captioned matter pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 25(c); (2) Actavis Elizabeth LLC is hereby dismissed, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); and (3) the official case caption and docket are hereby amended to reflect this change. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/14/2013) (djc) Modified on 1/15/2013 (djc).
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 520 STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC FOR ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC AS THE DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF IN THIS ACTION: Par is hereby substituted in place of Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Actavis Elizabeth LLC in the above-captioned matter pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 25(c); (2) Actavis Elizabeth LLC is hereby dismissed, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); and (3) the official case caption and docket are hereby amended to reflect this change. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/14/2013) (djc)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting #486 Motion for a Protective Order. Please visit the Court's Website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov for Sealed Records Filing Instructions. The motions below were granted as set forth on the record during the trial of this action. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall terminate the following motions: #486 in In re Oxycontin Antitrust Litigation, 04 md 1603 (SHS); #206 in Purdue v. Ranbaxy, 10 Civ. 3734 (SHS); # 43 in Purdue v. Ranbaxy, 11 Civ. 2401 (SHS); # 44 in Purdue v. Ranbaxy, 11 Civ. 7104 (SHS). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/9/2013) (ft) Modified on 1/14/2013 (ft).
January 8, 2013 Filing 518 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., AND RHODES TECHNOLOGIES AND RANBAXY INC., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED settling action between and among those parties. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/8/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(ml)
January 4, 2013 Filing 517 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (514 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 80 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 98 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 97 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 102 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement And Invalidity Of The Chapman Patents.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
January 4, 2013 Filing 516 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
January 4, 2013 Filing 515 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (80 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 514 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 98 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 102 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 97 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement And Invalidity Of The Chapman Patents.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
January 4, 2013 Filing 514 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement And Invalidity Of The Chapman Patents. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
January 4, 2013 Filing 513 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (94 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 76 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 93 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 98 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 510 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity And Non-Infringement Of The 042 Patent.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
January 4, 2013 Filing 512 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
January 4, 2013 Filing 511 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (94 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 76 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 93 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 98 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 510 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity And Non-Infringement Of The 042 Patent.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
January 4, 2013 Filing 510 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity And Non-Infringement Of The 042 Patent. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 509 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' FILING OF AN AMENDED ANSWER: In view of that Order, and the Court's corresponding Orders in Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Actavis Elizabeth LLC, 11-civ-2038-SHS (S.D.N.Y.) (D.I. 65); Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Impax Laboratories, Inc., 11-civ-2400-SHS (S.D.N.Y.) (D.I. 63); Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., 11-civ-2037-SHS (S.D.N.Y.) (D.I. 74); and Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, 11-civ-8158-SHS (S.D.N.Y.) (D.I. 54), Plaintiffs will not oppose Defendants Watson Laboratories, Inc. - Florida and Andrx Labs, LLC filing of an Amended Answer to include the defense of collateral estoppel. Having considered the foregoing stipulation, the Court hereby grants Defendants leave to file their Amended Answer. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/20/2012) (ft)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER granting #504 Motion for Karen R. Poppel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (Stein, Sidney)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting #503 Motion for Matthew A. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (Stein, Sidney)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #502 Motion for Angela Verrecchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (Stein, Sidney)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER granting (501) Motion for Barbara L. Mullin to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting [] Motion for Barbara L. Mullin to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-00766-SHS; granting [] Motion for Barbara L. Mullin to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-06047-SHS (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Stein, Sidney)
November 30, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (85 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS) MOTION for Barbara L. Mullin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8022290. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(wb)
November 30, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (86 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS) MOTION for Angela Verrecchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8022311. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(wb)
November 30, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (87 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS) MOTION for Matthew A. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8022354. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(wb)
November 30, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (88 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS) MOTION for Karen R. Poppel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8022378. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(wb)
November 30, 2012 Filing 504 MOTION for Karen R. Poppel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8022378. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KVK-Tech, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Poppel, Karen)
November 30, 2012 Filing 503 MOTION for Matthew A. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8022354. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KVK-Tech, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Pearson, Matthew)
November 30, 2012 Filing 502 MOTION for Angela Verrecchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8022311. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KVK-Tech, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Verrecchio, Angela)
November 30, 2012 Filing 501 MOTION for Barbara L. Mullin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8022290. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by KVK-Tech, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Mullin, Barbara)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER. Expert Discovery due by 7/5/2013. Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2013. Motions in limine due by 8/23/2013. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2013. Responses due by 9/6/2013. Replies due by 2/8/2013. Ready for Trial by 9/23/2013, and as further set forth regarding the briefing of Varam and KVK-Tech's proposed motions for summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/8/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(rjm)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER granting #492 Motion for Karen R. Poppel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (Stein, Sidney)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER granting #491 Motion for Matthew A. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (Stein, Sidney)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting #490 Motion for Angela Verrecchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (Stein, Sidney)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER granting #489 Motion for Barbara L. Mullin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Sidney H. Stein)(Text Only Order) (Stein, Sidney)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 495 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Discovery due by 7/5/2013., Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2013., Motions in Limine due by 8/23/2013., Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2013., Final Pretrial Conference 9/16/2013. Ready for Trial by 9/23/2013, see document for other deadlines. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/7/2012) (cd)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: The withdrawal of the appearance of David M. Hashmall as counsel of record for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(cd)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER: Trial set for 11/16/2012 at 09:30 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. The pretrial conference scheduled for November 7, 2012 is adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(cd)
November 7, 2012 Filing 492 MOTION for Karen R. Poppel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7958513. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Noramco Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Poppel, Karen)
November 7, 2012 Filing 491 MOTION for Matthew A. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7958427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Noramco Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Pearson, Matthew)
November 7, 2012 Filing 490 MOTION for Angela Verrecchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7958365. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Noramco Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Verrecchio, Angela)
November 7, 2012 Filing 489 MOTION for Barbara L. Mullin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7958168. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Noramco Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Mullin, Barbara)
November 5, 2012 Filing 488 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
November 1, 2012 Filing 487 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Noramco Inc., Noramco Inc.. Document filed by Noramco Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Woodson, Jennifer)
November 1, 2012 Filing 486 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support for its Motion for Protective Order to Close the Courtroom, Seal Certain Noramco Docuements and Seal Portions of the Trial Transcript. Document filed by Noramco Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Woodson, Jennifer)
November 1, 2012 Filing 485 NOTICE of Motion for Protective Order. Document filed by Noramco Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Woodson, Jennifer)
November 1, 2012 Filing 484 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support for its Motion. Document filed by Noramco Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Woodson, Jennifer)
November 1, 2012 Filing 483 NOTICE of Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Noramco Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Woodson, Jennifer)
November 1, 2012 Filing 482 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lee Woodson on behalf of Noramco Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Woodson, Jennifer)
October 26, 2012 Filing 481 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING AUTHENTICITY: Plaintiffs and counterclaim defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., and Rhodes Technologies (collectively, "Plaintiffs") and defendants and counterclaim plaintiffs Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., (collectively, "Ranbaxy") and Actavis Elizabeth LLC ("Actavis") (collectively, "Defendants") hereby stipulate as follows: This stipulation shall apply to documents produced during discovery from the files of Plaintiffs, Ranbaxy, Actavis, Organic Consultants, Inc., Catalent Pharma Solutions, Analytical Research Laboratories, ARL BioPharma, Inc., LC Resources, Chemir Analytical Services, Chemir Evans Analytical Group, Avomeen Analytical Services, Darby & Darby P.C., Davidson, Davidson & Kappel, LLC, Ma1linckrodt, Inc., or Noramco, Inc., which appear on their face to have been authored by an employee or officer of any of the Plaintiffs or Defendants, or by a third party engaged by any of the Plaintiffs or Defendants in the ordinary course of business. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(lb)
October 25, 2012 Filing 480 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Hashmall, David)
October 22, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings:( Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2012 at 03:30 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (ama)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at today's pretrial conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED. in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting in part and denying in part (109) Motion to Compel; finding as moot (134) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS; granting in part and denying in part [] Motion to Compel; finding as moot [] Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(ama)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at today's pretrial conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: As set forth herein: SO ORDERED. in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; denying (42) Motion ; denying (53) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (57) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (61) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (65) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (69) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (74) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (78) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (82) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:10-cv-06038-SHS; granting (33) Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying (38) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (42) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (46) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (50) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (54) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (59) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (63) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (67) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:11-cv-00766-SHS; denying (32) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (36) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (40) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (44) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (48) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (53) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (57) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (61) Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot (5) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting (14) Motion to Transfer Case; granting (14) Motion to Stay in case 1:12-cv-02814-SHS; granting (35) Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying (39) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (43) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (47) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (51) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (55) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (60) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (64) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (68) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:12-cv-06047-SHS; denying (47) Motion ; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (68) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (42) Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying (49) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (66) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting [] Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying (43) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (47) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (51) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (55) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (59) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (64) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:12-cv-02814-SHS; denying [] Motion ; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting [] Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot [] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting [] Motion to Transfer Case; granting [] Motion to Stay ; granting [] Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting [] Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying (44) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (55) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (59) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (36) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (43) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (47) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot (4) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting [] Motion to Transfer Case; granting [] Motion to Stay ; granting [] Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:10-cv-06038-SHS; denying (36) Motion ; denying (48) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (52) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (56) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (69) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (28) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (34) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (37) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot [] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting (16) Motion to Transfer Case; granting [] Motion to Stay ; granting [] Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying (33) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (40) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (44) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (48) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (61) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:11-cv-00766-SHS; denying [] Motion ; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (72) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (38) Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying (45) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (49) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (53) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (57) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (66) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (70) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying [] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (36) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (40) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (44) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (49) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (53) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (57) Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot [] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting (13) Motion to Transfer Case; granting [] Motion to Stay in case 1:12-cv-06047-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(ama)
October 19, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Pretrial Conference held on 10/19/2012. (lab)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 477 OPINION & ORDER. For the reasons set forth above, KVK's motion to dismiss is construed as a motion for summary judgment and denied. Defendants' motion to transfer this action to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania or in the alternative stay this action is denied to the extent it seeks transfer, but granted to the extent this action is stayed in favor of No. 11 Civ. 766, the essentially identical action already transferred into this multidistrict litigation from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(lmb)
October 19, 2012 Filing 476 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 19, 2012 Filing 475 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 19, 2012 Filing 474 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 19, 2012 Filing 473 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 19, 2012 Filing 472 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 19, 2012 Filing 471 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 19, 2012 Filing 470 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 19, 2012 Filing 469 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Donald Luther Rhoads to RE-FILE Document (62 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 76 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 61 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 459 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 55 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (46 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 52 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 53 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 450 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 67 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (80 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 65 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 66 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 463 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 59 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (55 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 41 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 34 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 40 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 438 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (63 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 446 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 48 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 49 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 42 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (467 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 69 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 63 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 84 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 70 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (71 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 454 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 57 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 56 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 50 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (44 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 45 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 442 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 59 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 38 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Use the event type Rule 56.1 Statement found under the event list Other Answers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(ldi)
October 18, 2012 Filing 468 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (82 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 68 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 61 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 67 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 465 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents For Indefiniteness.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 467 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (465 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 82 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 68 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 61 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 67 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents For Indefiniteness. (STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS). Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald) Modified on 10/19/2012 (ldi).
October 18, 2012 Filing 466 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (465 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 82 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 68 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 61 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 67 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents For Indefiniteness.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 465 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents For Indefiniteness. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 464 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (64 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 63 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 461 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 57 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 78 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement Of The 800 Chapman Patent.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 463 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (64 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 63 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 461 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 57 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 78 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement Of The 800 Chapman Patent. (STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS). Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald) Modified on 10/19/2012 (ldi).
October 18, 2012 Filing 462 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (64 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 63 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 461 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 57 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 78 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement Of The 800 Chapman Patent.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 461 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement Of The 800 Chapman Patent. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 460 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (59 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 53 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 60 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 74 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 457 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement Of The Three Chapman Patents.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 459 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (59 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 53 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 60 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 74 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 457 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement Of The Three Chapman Patents. (STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS). Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald) Modified on 10/19/2012 (ldi).
October 18, 2012 Filing 458 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (59 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 53 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 60 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 74 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 457 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement Of The Three Chapman Patents.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 457 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement Of The Three Chapman Patents. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 456 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE DOCUMENT #458) - MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement Of The Three Chapman Patents. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald) Modified on 10/19/2012 (ldi).
October 18, 2012 Filing 455 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (452 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 55 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 48 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 69 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Product-By-Process Claims Of The Three Chapman Patents For Anticipation And Obviousness.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 454 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 55 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 48 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 69 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 452 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Product-By-Process Claims Of The Three Chapman Patents For Anticipation And Obviousness. (STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS). Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald) Modified on 10/19/2012 (ldi).
October 18, 2012 Filing 453 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 55 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 48 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 69 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 452 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Product-By-Process Claims Of The Three Chapman Patents For Anticipation And Obviousness.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 452 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Product-By-Process Claims Of The Three Chapman Patents For Anticipation And Obviousness. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 451 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (50 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 65 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 448 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 51 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 44 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents For Failure To Provide An Adequate Written Description.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 450 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (50 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 65 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 448 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 51 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 44 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents For Failure To Provide An Adequate Written Description. (STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS). Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald) Modified on 10/19/2012 (ldi).
October 18, 2012 Filing 449 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (50 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 65 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 448 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 51 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 44 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents For Failure To Provide An Adequate Written Description.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 448 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents For Failure To Provide An Adequate Written Description. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 447 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (47 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 40 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 444 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 61 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents As Obvious And Under The Doctrine Of Collateral Estoppel.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 446 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (444 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 61 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 47 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 40 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents As Obvious And Under The Doctrine Of Collateral Estoppel. (STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS). Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald) Modified on 10/19/2012 (ldi).
October 18, 2012 Filing 445 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (444 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 61 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 47 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 40 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents As Obvious And Under The Doctrine Of Collateral Estoppel.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 444 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The Three Chapman Patents As Obvious And Under The Doctrine Of Collateral Estoppel. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 443 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (36 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 57 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 440 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 43 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The 042 Patent Based On Inherent Anticipation From Purdues Earlier Work.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 442 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (36 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 57 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 440 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 43 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The 042 Patent Based On Inherent Anticipation From Purdues Earlier Work. (STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS). Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald) Modified on 10/19/2012 (ldi).
October 18, 2012 Filing 441 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (36 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 57 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 440 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 43 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The 042 Patent Based On Inherent Anticipation From Purdues Earlier Work.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 440 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The 042 Patent Based On Inherent Anticipation From Purdues Earlier Work. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 439 DECLARATION of Geoffrey G. Hu in Support re: (436 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 32 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 53 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 39 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 38 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The 042 Patent Based On Double Patenting Over The 295 And 331 Patents.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 438 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (32 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 436 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 53 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 39 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 38 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The 042 Patent Based On Double Patenting Over The 295 And 331 Patents. (STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS). Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald) Modified on 10/19/2012 (ldi).
October 18, 2012 Filing 437 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (32 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 436 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 53 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 39 in 1:12-cv-06047-SHS, 38 in 1:11-cv-00766-SHS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The 042 Patent Based On Double Patenting Over The 295 And 331 Patents.. Document filed by Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 18, 2012 Filing 436 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Of The 042 Patent Based On Double Patenting Over The 295 And 331 Patents. Document filed by Varam, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS, 1:12-cv-06047-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER: 1.Mallinckrodt's request to seal the materials recorded at Docket Numbers 169, 170, 171, 172, 173, and 174 is granted. 2.Mallinckrodt's motion to intervene solely for purposes of seeking an order closing the courtroom during certain testimony and sealing the relevant portions of the transcript and the related Mallinckrodt Documents (Dkt. No. 169) is granted. 3.The Court will decide Mallinckrodt's "Motion for Protective Order to Close Courtroom and Seal Portions of the Transcript and Certain Mallinckrodt Documents" (Dkt. No. 171) if and when the issue arises at trial. Accordingly, immediately prior to the introduction of the evidence that Mallinckrodt contends will reveal its trade secrets, the parties shall alert the Court in order for it to determine the appropriateness of sealing the relevant portion of the proceeding. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/16/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(js)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference to discuss any pending motions on Friday, October 19 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 23A. Out-of-town counsel may appear for the October 19 conference telephonically by calling the courtroom at (212) 805-0087 at 2:30 p.m. ( Status Conference set for 10/19/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/12/2012) (ja)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference to discuss any pending motions on Friday, October 19 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 23A. Out-of-town counsel may appear for the October 19 conference telephonically by calling the courtroom at (212) 805-0087 at 2:30 p.m. ( Status Conference set for 10/19/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS(ja)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 432 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... This protective order may be amended for good cause shown. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/11/2012) (cd)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 431 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-6047(SHS), 1:04-md-1603(SHS) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
August 3, 2012 Filing 430 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Pennsylvania, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Sidney H. Stein, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/2/2012) (sjo)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER APPROVING DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND: that the administrative determinations of the Claim; Administrator accepting certain claims and rejecting certain claim; as indicated on the printouts of accepted and rejected claim; submitted with and described in the Rosenbamn Affidavit are hereby approved; and it is further ORDERED, that the Claim Administrator be paid the sum of $44,767.93 from the Settlement Fund for its fees and expenses incurred in connection with administering the Settlement herein; and it is further ORDERED, that within 90 days of distribution of the Settlement Fund, the Purdue Defendants shall provide Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel with a full accounting of how the Settlement Fund plus interest was distributed. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(pl)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 428 STIPULATION AND FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs and counterclaim defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., and Rhodes Technologies (collectively, "Plaintiffs") and defendants and counterclaim plaintiffs Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., and Actavis Elizabeth LLC (collectively, "Defendants") hereby stipulate, subject to the consent of the Court, that the January 11, 2012 Scheduling Order [D.I. 116] is amended as follows: Opening Briefs for Motions in Limine due by 10/9/2012, Expert Discovery due by 8/10/2012, Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/24/2012, Rebuttal Briefs for Motions in Limine due by 10/23/2012, Trial - November 13, 2012 or as soon thereafter as the Court is available. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/13/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(djc) Modified on 6/14/2012 (djc).
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 427 STIPULATION AND SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), plaintiffs and counterclaim defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., and Rhodes Technologies(collectively, "Plaintiffs") and defendants and counterclaim plaintiffs Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., and Actavis Elizabeth LLC (collectively, "Defendants") have met and conferred and agreed upon a short extension to expert discovery and certain subsequent deadlines. nus extension does not change the dates by which the parties will be ready for the Pretrial Conference or Trial. The parties hereby stipulate, subject to the consent of the Court, that the previous January 11, 2012 Scheduling Order [D.I. 116] is amended as follows. Opening Briefs for Motions in Limine due by 10/22/2012, Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2012, Rebuttal Briefs for Motion in limine due by 10/29/2012) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/12/2012) (djc)
May 18, 2012 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (426 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 20 in 1:12-cv-02814-SHS) Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS(jfe)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL: It is hereby Ordered that the following documents: Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Transfer Or, In The Alternative, Stay Proceedings. Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant KVK-Tech, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant Varam, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction; and Confidential Exhibits to the Declaration of Thomas A Wang in support of Plaintiffs' Oppositions, shall be filed by the Clerk of the Court under seal, and shall remain filed under seal until further Order of this Court. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/18/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:12-cv-02814-SHS(jfe)
April 18, 2012 Filing 425 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Rosenbaum in Support re: (60 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 70 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 423 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 67 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 76 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 84 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 76 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS) AMENDED MOTION for Disbursement of Funds.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan)
April 18, 2012 Filing 424 AFFIDAVIT of Scott W. Fisher in Support re: (67 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 60 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 76 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 70 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 84 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 76 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 423 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) AMENDED MOTION for Disbursement of Funds.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Approval Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan)
April 18, 2012 Filing 423 AMENDED MOTION for Disbursement of Funds. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan)
April 18, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Dan Litvin to RE-FILE Document (75 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 83 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 69 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 75 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 66 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 422 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS) Affidavit in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document linked to filing error. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(db)
April 18, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Dan Litvin to RE-FILE Document (74 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 61 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 65 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 68 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 74 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 82 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 58 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 421 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Disbursement of Funds. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(db)
April 17, 2012 Filing 422 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Michael Rosenbaum in Support re: (61 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 65 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 82 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 58 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 74 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 68 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 74 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 421 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION for Disbursement of Funds.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan) Modified on 4/18/2012 (db).
April 17, 2012 Filing 421 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Disbursement of Funds. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Scott W. Fisher, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan) Modified on 4/18/2012 (db).
April 10, 2012 Filing 420 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 419 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential information... (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/9/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 1:11-cv-00766-SHS(pl)
February 9, 2012 Filing 418 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Ranbaxy's Motion to Compel (Redacted Version). Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
February 6, 2012 Filing 417 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Vikram A. Mathrani in Support re: #402 MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii). MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii).. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharama Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hendler, Pablo)
February 6, 2012 Filing 416 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #402 MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii). MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii).. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Hendler, Pablo)
January 26, 2012 Filing 415 DECLARATION of Donald L. Rhoads in Opposition re: (42 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 402 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii). MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii).. Document filed by KVK-Tech, Inc., Varam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
January 26, 2012 Filing 414 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (402 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 42 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii). MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii).. Document filed by KVK-Tech, Inc., Varam, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(Rhoads, Donald)
January 25, 2012 Filing 413 DECLARATION of Vikram A. Mathrani (Public Version) in Opposition re: (109 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS) MOTION to Compel Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Rhodes Technologies to Produce Non-Privileged Documents.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
January 25, 2012 Filing 412 DECLARATION of Thomas A. Wang (Public Version) in Opposition re: (109 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS) MOTION to Compel Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Rhodes Technologies to Produce Non-Privileged Documents.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
January 25, 2012 Filing 411 DECLARATION of Oleg Ioselevich (Public Version) in Opposition re: (109 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS) MOTION to Compel Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Rhodes Technologies to Produce Non-Privileged Documents.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
January 25, 2012 Filing 410 DECLARATION of Alan L.Koller (Public Version) in Opposition re: (109 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS) MOTION to Compel Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Rhodes Technologies to Produce Non-Privileged Documents.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
January 25, 2012 Filing 409 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (109 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS) MOTION to Compel Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Rhodes Technologies to Produce Non-Privileged Documents. (PUBLIC VERSION). Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 408 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS RANBAXY INC., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., AND RANBAXY LABORATORIES LTD.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF NON-PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS: The time within which Ranbaxy shall file its reply to Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Production of Non-Privileged Documents is extended up to and including January 23, 2012.( Replies due by 1/23/2012.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/13/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(djc)
January 12, 2012 Filing 407 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from William R. Zimmerman dated 1/6/2012 re: I write this letter in response to Pablo D. Hendler's letter on behalf of Plaintiffs to the Court dated January 5, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: After review of the Jan. 5 and 6 letters of the parties, the Court denied Purdue's request for the Court to strike Ranbaxy's motion to compel and extends Purdue's last date to oppose the motion until January 12. The document at issue will be reviewed in camera. (Responses due by 1/12/2012). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/9/2012) (rjm)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 406 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), following the Courts December 27, 2011 Status Conference and the Court's January 3, 2012 telephone Conference with counsel for the parties, Plaintiffs and counterclaim defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., and Rhodes Technologies (collectively, "Plaintiffs") and defendants and counterclaim plaintiffs Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., and Actavis Elizabeth LLC (collectively, "Defendants") hereby stipulate, subject to the consent of the Court, to the amended pre-trial schedule as further specified in this stipulation and order. (Expert Discovery due by 8/3/2012. Fact Discovery due by 3/2/2012. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/24/2012. Ready for Trial by 11/13/2012), and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/11/2012) (rjm)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER: William Zimmerman, Esq.'s letter to the Court dated January 6, 2012, states that it is "Highly Confidential-For Chamber's Only." The Court sees no reason to seal this document. If either party disagrees they should notify the Court in writing, on or before the end of business on January 11, 2012. If no response is received, the letter will be publicly filed on January 12, 2012. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/10/2012) (rdz) Modified on 1/10/2012 (rdz).
January 9, 2012 Filing 404 DECLARATION of Rebecca R. Hermes in Support re: (42 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii). MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii).. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
January 9, 2012 Filing 403 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (42 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS) MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii). MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii).. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
January 9, 2012 Filing 402 MOTION TO TOLL THE STATUTORY 30-MONTH STAY OF FDA PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. 355(j)(5)(B)(iii). Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
January 3, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/10/2012. Replies due by 1/20/2012. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(lmb)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 401 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANTS RANBAXY INC., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC., AND RANBAXY LABORATORIES LTD.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF NON-PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the parties, subject to the Court's approval, that: 1. The time within which Plaintiffs shall file its opposition to Defendants Ranbaxy, Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Production of Non-Privileged Documents is extended up to and including January 10, 2012; and 2. The time within which Ranbaxy shall file its reply to Plaintiff's opposition is extended up to and including January 20, 2012. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(lmb)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER: in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; denying (65) Motion to Bifurcate; granting (74) Motion to Consolidate Cases 10cv3734 (as Lead Case) with 11cv7104, 11cv2401 in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. 1. By consent of the parties, Actavis's third counterclaim in Case No.1 0 Civ. 3734 is dismissed with prejudice. Accordingly, Purdue's motion to dismiss Actavis's third counterclaim in Case No. 10 Civ. 3734 (Dkt. No. 31) is dismissed as moot. 2. Ranbaxy and Actavis's joint motion to bifurcate exceptional case claims in Case No.1 0 Civ. 3734 (Dkt. No. 65) is denied. 3. Ranbaxy's motion to consolidate Case No. 10 Civ. 3734 with Case No. 11 Civ. 2401 (Case No.1 0 Civ. 3734, Dkt. No. 74) is granted. 4. By consent of the parties, the Court consolidates Case No. 11 Civ. 7104 with Case No. 10 Civ.3734. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/27/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(djc)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER GRANTING TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: Kenneth G. Schuler is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Actavis Elizabeth LLC in this action. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/21/2011) ***This Order shall be filed in all cases listed as per instructions from Chambers. (tro)
November 16, 2011 Filing 398 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ADMIT JONATHAN E. BACHAND AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (98) Motion for Jonathan E. Bachand to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(jfe)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 396 OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over the action, defendants' motion to stay the remand order is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/6/2011) (js)
October 6, 2011 Filing 395 Letter addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Stephen B. Devereaux dated 10/4/2011 re: Counsel for the Defendants writes to request that this Court reject the Commonwealth's request to strike Purdue's Motion to Stay. Document filed by Purdue Defendants. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS (ab)
October 6, 2011 Filing 394 Letter addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Sean J. Riley dated 9/30/2011 re: Counsel for the Plaintiff writes to request that this Court strike the Defendant's pending Motion from the docket. This action will effectively confirm the Commonwealth's position that the Defendants' appellate rights are properly asserted in the 2nd Circuit Court of Appeals. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS (ab)
September 27, 2011 Filing 393 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS, 392 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION to Stay re: (390 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,. MOTION to Stay re: (390 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,.. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Devereaux, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 Filing 392 MOTION to Stay re: (390 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Devereaux, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Stephen B. Devereaux to RE-FILE Document (42 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS, 391 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION to Stay re: (41 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS, 390 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. MOTION to Stay re: (41 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS, 390 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(ldi)
September 27, 2011 Filing 391 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Stay re: (41 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS, 390 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Devereaux, Stephen) Modified on 9/27/2011 (ldi).
September 26, 2011 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: (41 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS) Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(js)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 390 OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, defendants have failed to meet their burden of establishing that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Plaintiffs' motion to remand is granted. in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (9) Motion to Remand to State Court in case 1:08-cv-03380-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/26/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(js)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting (388) Motion for M. King Hill, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS. M. King Hill, III is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/6/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(ft)
September 1, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #388 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 08/26/2011, Receipt Number 1015145. (jd)
August 26, 2011 Filing 388 MOTION for M. King Hill III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.(pgu)
August 25, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #386 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #385 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #384 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #387 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $800.00, paid on 08/19/2011, Receipt Number 1014621,1014622,1014623,1014624. (jd)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (85) Motion for Kerstyn H. Crumb to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. Kerstyn H. Crumb is admitted Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Rhodes Technologies. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/24/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(mro) Modified on 8/29/2011 (mro). Modified on 8/29/2011 (mro).
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (86) Motion for Adrienne P. Hale to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. Adrienne P. Hale is admitted Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Rhodes Technologies. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/24/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(mro) Modified on 8/29/2011 (mro). Modified on 8/29/2011 (mro).
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (88) Motion for Kelly L. Baxter to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. Kelly L. Baxter is admitted Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Rhodes Technologies. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/24/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(mro) Modified on 8/29/2011 (mro). Modified on 8/29/2011 (mro).
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Barna De is admitted Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Rhodes Technologies. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/24/2011) (mro)
July 26, 2011 Filing 383 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Sean J. Riley dated 7/15/11 re: counsel for plaintiff Commonwealth of Kentucky respectfully requests that this Court deny defendant Purdue Pharma's July 1, 2011 request for leave of court to file a supplemental reply brief to address what it deems are "issues and arguments raised for the first time" in the Commonwealth's recently filed reply brief. ENDORSEMENT: Purdue's request to file an additional brief is denied. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/26/11) (pl)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting (379) Motion for Merritt E. McAlister, Chilton D. Varner, Steven B. Devereaux, Eric M. Wachter to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (34) Motion for Merritt E. McAlister, Chilton D. Varner, Steven B. Devereaux, Eric M. Wachter to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-03380-SHS for Purdu Pharma LP. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/15/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(cd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (cd).
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (33) Motion for Sean James Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-03380-SHS for defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/14/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(cd)
June 13, 2011 Filing 380 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (65 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS) JOINT MOTION to Bifurcate. Exceptional Case Claims. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 378 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING RANBAXY INC., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS., RANBAXY LABORATORIES LTD. AND ACTAVIS ELIBETH LLC.'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE EXCEPTIONAL CASE CLAIMS: Purdue shall serve and file its opposition papers to the June 13, 2011. Moving Defendants shall serve and file their reply papers by June 23, 2011. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(jpo)
May 31, 2011 Filing 377 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (235 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 9 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS) MOTION to Remand to State Court. Purdue Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
May 27, 2011 Filing 379 MOTION for Chilton Varner, Stephen Devereaux, Eric Wachter, Merritt McAlister to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company, Inc., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, Ltd., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(sjo)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Stephen B. Devereaux dated 5/24/2011 re: request the Court permit the Purdue Defendants to file an opening memorandum of 30 pages and a reply memorandum of 15 pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/25/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(jar)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 375 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(l)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs Albertson's, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Safeway Inc., and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/17/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-09649-SHS (lnl)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 374 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(l)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/17/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03719-SHS (lnl)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 373 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs Walgreen Co., Eckerd Corporation, Maxi Drug, Inc. d/b/a Brooks Pharmacy, The Kroger Co., American Sales Company, Inc., and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff s claims. SO ORDERED. (Docketed in Case No. 04 CV 01446) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/17/2011) (lnl)
May 16, 2011 Filing 372 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03719-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
May 16, 2011 Filing 371 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) P.F. Laboratories Inc., Perdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories Inc., Perdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-09649-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
May 16, 2011 Filing 370 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharama Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharama Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-01446-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Stephen B. Devereaux and Sean J. Reily dated 5/9/2011 re: Counsel for defendants write to follow up on communications with your deputy concerning the briefing schedule for plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. The parties have met and conferred and jointly request the opportunity to submit additional briefing on the Motion on the following schedule: opening briefs to be filed within 20 days of the order approving the briefing schedule. Reply briefs (if necessary) to be filed 10 days thereafter. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/9/11) (js)
March 11, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Timothy Hester Document #368 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Sidney H. Stein for approval. (dt)
March 10, 2011 Filing 368 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS(Hester, Timothy) Modified on 3/11/2011 (dt).
March 1, 2011 Filing 367 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by John E. Nathan, withdrawing as counsel for Plaintiffs Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F Laboratories Inc., and The Purdue Pharama Company. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/1/2011) (jar)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. ORDER granting (365) Motion for Thomas A. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (40) Motion for Thomas A. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.in case 1:10-cv-06038-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/23/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(db)
February 16, 2011 Filing 365 MOTION for Thomas A. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(mro)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 364 PROTECTIVE ORDER: The parties and any non-party subject to discovery in this action are bound by the terms of this protective order governing the production of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(jar)
February 4, 2011 Filing 363 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vikram Alexander Mathrani on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(Mathrani, Vikram)
February 3, 2011 Filing 362 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of other than the SDNY, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Sidney H. Stein, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/3/2011) (rjm)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Pablo D. Hendler dated 1/7/11 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs ("Purdue") request permission to file the following documents under seal in compliance with the Court's Sealed Records Filing Instructions without a signed protective order: Plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' Motion to Transfer or, in the alternative, Stay Proceedings; Plaintiffs' opposition to defendant KVK-Tech, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' complaint; Plaintiffs' opposition to defendant Varam, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; and Exhibits 1-24, 31, 37-39, 41-44, 50, and 56-59 to the Declaration of Thomas A. Wang. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/25/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(mro) Modified on 2/2/2011 (mro).
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT approving settlement between direct purchasers class plaintiffs and defendants Purdue Pharma L.P. (individually, and as successor in interest to the Purdue Pharma Company), the Purdue Frederick Company, the P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., and Purdue Pharma Inc., awarding attorneys' fees and expenses, awarding representative plaintiff incentive awards, approving plan of allocation, and ordering dismissal as to all defendants. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/25/11) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(ml)
November 29, 2010 Filing 359 AFFIDAVIT of Bruce E. Gerstein in Support re: #357 MOTION for Attorney Fees., #355 MOTION to Approve THE ALLOCATION PLAN AND SETTLEMENT.. Document filed by Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1. Garwin Gerstein & Fisher LLP Lodestar, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2. Garwin Gerstein & Fisher LLP Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3. Garwin Gerstein & Fisher Expenses, #4 Exhibit Ex. A. AmeriSourceBergen Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex. B. Cardinal Health Letter, #6 Exhibit Ex. C. McKesson Letter, #7 Exhibit Ex D. Rosenbaum Affidavit, #8 Exhibit Ex. E. Doud (RDC) Affidavit, #9 Exhibit Ex. F. LWD Declaration, #10 Exhibit Ex. G. Cramer Declaration, #11 Exhibit Ex. H. Drubel Declaration, #12 Exhibit Ex. I. O'Connor Declaration, #13 Exhibit Ex. J. Durrette Declaration, #14 Exhibit Ex. K. Richards Declaration, #15 Exhibit Ex. L. Battin Declaration, #16 Exhibit Ex. M. Moskowitz Declaration, #17 Exhibit Ex. N. Vanek Declaration, #18 Exhibit Ex. O. Sweeney Declaration, #19 Exhibit Ex. P. Smith Declaration, #20 Exhibit Ex. Q. Des Roches Declaration, #21 Exhibit Ex. R. Kilsheimer Declaration, #22 Exhibit Ex. S. Nast Declaration, #23 Exhibit Ex. T. Roberts Declaration, #24 Exhibit Ex. U. Piper Declaration, #25 Exhibit Ex. V. Chorush Declaration, #26 Exhibit Ex. W. Landskroner Declaration, #27 Exhibit Ex. X. Shingler Declaration)(Litvin, Dan)
November 29, 2010 Filing 358 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (357 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 91 in 1:04-cv-03499-SHS, 96 in 1:02-cv-02803-SHS, 65 in 1:01-cv-08177-SHS, 17 in 1:09-cv-08878-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-08553-SHS, 110 in 1:01-cv-08507-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 74 in 1:02-cv-08036-SHS, 56 in 1:04-cv-08552-SHS, 71 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 64 in 1:04-cv-00154-SHS, 77 in 1:04-cv-01446-SHS, 70 in 1:05-cv-03500-SHS, 93 in 1:04-cv-00651-SHS, 33 in 1:07-cv-08002-SHS, 43 in 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 76 in 1:04-cv-03093-SHS, 100 in 1:04-cv-01212-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-00607-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 74 in 1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 39 in 1:06-cv-15326-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-07621-SHS, 97 in 1:04-cv-02179-SHS, 60 in 1:04-cv-02298-SHS, 64 in 1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-04895-SHS, 55 in 1:05-cv-08528-SHS, 64 in 1:04-cv-03156-SHS, 26 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 99 in 1:04-cv-02089-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-09649-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03295-SHS, 71 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-04961-SHS, 70 in 1:04-cv-00487-SHS, 50 in 1:07-cv-04810-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-04575-SHS, 60 in 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 67 in 1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 92 in 1:04-cv-01808-SHS, 194 in 1:99-cv-03658-SHS, 65 in 1:04-cv-03719-SHS, 61 in 1:04-cv-00929-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-07119-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-07116-SHS, 59 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS, 70 in 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-02604-SHS, 69 in 1:04-cv-00314-SHS, 79 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 96 in 1:04-cv-00196-SHS, 62 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 80 in 1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 23 in 1:10-cv-04350-SHS, 66 in 1:01-cv-02109-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-02749-SHS, 58 in 1:05-cv-04761-SHS, 64 in 1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 65 in 1:03-cv-02312-SHS, 67 in 1:04-cv-05450-SHS, 80 in 1:04-cv-00957-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-04894-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-05256-SHS, 54 in 1:05-cv-03285-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-05253-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-07117-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-07080-SHS, 56 in 1:04-cv-04892-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03131-SHS, 77 in 1:02-cv-07569-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-02297-SHS, 56 in 1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 97 in 1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 81 in 1:04-cv-04039-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-04960-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-07118-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 58 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 65 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 24 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03132-SHS) MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compendium of Cases)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan)
November 29, 2010 Filing 357 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan)
November 29, 2010 Filing 356 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (55 in 1:04-cv-03131-SHS, 22 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS, 15 in 1:09-cv-08878-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-07080-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-07116-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 69 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-00154-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-04961-SHS, 61 in 1:04-cv-00607-SHS, 63 in 1:03-cv-02312-SHS, 72 in 1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 75 in 1:04-cv-01446-SHS, 56 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-03156-SHS, 95 in 1:04-cv-02179-SHS, 78 in 1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 72 in 1:02-cv-08036-SHS, 31 in 1:07-cv-08002-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-07117-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-07118-SHS, 68 in 1:04-cv-00487-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-05256-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02297-SHS, 48 in 1:07-cv-04810-SHS, 97 in 1:04-cv-02089-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-04892-SHS, 89 in 1:04-cv-03499-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-04895-SHS, 91 in 1:04-cv-00651-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-07621-SHS, 65 in 1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 64 in 1:01-cv-02109-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 65 in 1:04-cv-05450-SHS, 57 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 98 in 1:04-cv-01212-SHS, 68 in 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 78 in 1:04-cv-00957-SHS, 94 in 1:04-cv-00196-SHS, 90 in 1:04-cv-01808-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-04894-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-04575-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-00929-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 94 in 1:02-cv-02803-SHS, 75 in 1:02-cv-07569-SHS, 21 in 1:10-cv-04350-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 41 in 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-05253-SHS, 79 in 1:04-cv-04039-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-08553-SHS, 108 in 1:01-cv-08507-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-03295-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 58 in 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 68 in 1:05-cv-03500-SHS, 60 in 1:04-cv-09649-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-03719-SHS, 24 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 52 in 1:05-cv-03285-SHS, 37 in 1:06-cv-15326-SHS, 60 in 1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 60 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 95 in 1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02604-SHS, 355 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 69 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-08552-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02749-SHS, 63 in 1:01-cv-08177-SHS, 77 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 60 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-04960-SHS, 74 in 1:04-cv-03093-SHS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02298-SHS, 62 in 1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 53 in 1:05-cv-08528-SHS, 56 in 1:05-cv-04761-SHS, 192 in 1:99-cv-03658-SHS, 67 in 1:04-cv-00314-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-07119-SHS) MOTION to Approve THE ALLOCATION PLAN AND SETTLEMENT.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan)
November 29, 2010 Filing 355 MOTION to Approve THE ALLOCATION PLAN AND SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan)
October 14, 2010 Filing 354 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Mayte Balloveras, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/14/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS(jfe)
October 13, 2010 Filing 353 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), David White, the brother and closest living heir of Plaintiff Steven White (now deceased), and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/12/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03295-SHS(djc) Modified on 10/15/2010 (djc).
October 13, 2010 Filing 352 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
October 12, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Timothy Hester Document #351 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Sidney H. Stein for approval. (dt)
October 8, 2010 Filing 351 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03295-SHS(Hester, Timothy) Modified on 10/12/2010 (dt).
September 28, 2010 Filing 350 SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Steven White on November 27, 2008. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03295-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MEMORANDUM ENDORSEMENT re: #344 ORDER GRANTING DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT, CERTIFICATION OF THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS, APPOINTMENT OF GARWIN GERSTEIN & FISHER LLP, BERGER & MONTAGUE, P.C. AND BOIES, SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP AS CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL, APPROVAL OF THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE TO THE CLASS, AND SETTING THE FINAL SETTLEMENT SCHEDULE AND DATE FOR A FAIRNESS HEARING. ORDER granting (61) Motion for Settlement in case 1:01-cv-02109-SHS; granting (189) Motion for Settlement in case 1:99-cv-03658-SHS; granting (60) Motion for Settlement in case 1:01-cv-08177-SHS; granting (105) Motion for Settlement in case 1:01-cv-08507-SHS; granting (69) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00112-SHS; granting (59) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00154-SHS; granting (74) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00229-SHS; granting (91) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00196-SHS; granting (64) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00314-SHS; granting (57) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00327-SHS; granting (92) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00315-SHS; granting (66) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00494-SHS; granting (65) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00487-SHS; granting (58) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00607-SHS; granting (88) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00651-SHS; granting (59) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00637-SHS; granting (56) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00929-SHS; granting (75) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00957-SHS; granting (60) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-01014-SHS; granting (95) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-01212-SHS; granting (62) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-01083-SHS; granting (66) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-01354-SHS; granting (72) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-01446-SHS; granting (87) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-01808-SHS; granting (94) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02089-SHS; granting (75) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02078-SHS; granting (92) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02179-SHS; granting (55) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02298-SHS; granting (54) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02297-SHS; granting (54) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02378-SHS; granting (54) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02604-SHS; granting (54) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-02749-SHS; granting (71) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-03093-SHS; granting (52) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-03132-SHS; granting (52) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-03131-SHS; granting (59) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-03156-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-03295-SHS; granting (344) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (60) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-03719-SHS; granting (50) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-03890-SHS; granting (75) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-04039-SHS; granting (53) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-04574-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-04575-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-04895-SHS; granting (52) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-04894-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-04893-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-04960-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-04961-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-04962-SHS; granting (51) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-04892-SHS; granting (50) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-05256-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-05253-SHS; granting (62) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-05450-SHS; granting (54) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-07080-SHS; granting (50) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-07117-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-07118-SHS; granting (50) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-07119-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-07120-SHS; granting (51) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-07115-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-07116-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-07621-SHS; granting (51) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-08552-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-08553-SHS; granting (57) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-09649-SHS; granting (57) Motion for Settlement in case 1:04-cv-09813-SHS; granting (59) Motion for Settlement in case 1:01-cv-11212-SHS; granting (49) Motion for Settlement in case 1:05-cv-03285-SHS; granting (65) Motion for Settlement in case 1:05-cv-03500-SHS; granting (53) Motion for Settlement in case 1:05-cv-04761-SHS; granting (50) Motion for Settlement in case 1:05-cv-08528-SHS; granting (65) Motion for Settlement in case 1:06-cv-13095-SHS; granting (55) Motion for Settlement in case 1:06-cv-15304-SHS; granting (34) Motion for Settlement in case 1:06-cv-15326-SHS; granting (57) Motion for Settlement in case 1:07-cv-03972-SHS; granting (38) Motion for Settlement in case 1:07-cv-03973-SHS; granting (45) Motion for Settlement in case 1:07-cv-04810-SHS; granting (28) Motion for Settlement in case 1:07-cv-08002-SHS; granting (19) Motion for Settlement in case 1:08-cv-03380-SHS; granting (12) Motion for Settlement in case 1:09-cv-08878-SHS; granting (91) Motion for Settlement in case 1:02-cv-02803-SHS; granting (48) Motion for Settlement in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS; granting (18) Motion for Settlement in case 1:10-cv-04350-SHS; granting (9) Motion for Settlement in case 1:10-cv-06038-SHS; granting (72) Motion for Settlement in case 1:02-cv-07569-SHS; granting (69) Motion for Settlement in case 1:02-cv-08036-SHS; granting (60) Motion for Settlement in case 1:03-cv-02312-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/27/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(db)
September 23, 2010 Filing 348 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with prejudice with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03499-SHS(cd)
September 20, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Timothy Hester Document #347 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Sidney H. Stein for approval. (dt)
September 17, 2010 Filing 347 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03499-SHS(Hester, Timothy) Modified on 9/20/2010 (dt).
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER PERMITTING JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND SETTING SCHEDULE EXTENDING TIME FOR BRIEFING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TRANSFER VENUE: Purdue shall serve document requests on Defendants by September 20, 2010. Defendants shall respond to Purdue's document requests, including producing responsive documents by October 6, 2010. Purdue shall serve notices of deposition for witnesses to testify about the issues raised by Defendants' motions, by October 8, 2010. Purdue shall complete jurisdictional discovery including depositions by October 27, 2010. Purdue's opposition papers to all Defendants' September 2, 2010 motions shall be served and filed by November 10, 2010. Defendants' reply papers shall be served by November 24, 2010. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/15/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-06038-SHS(jpo) Modified on 9/29/2010 (jpo).
September 7, 2010 Filing 345 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (49 in 1:04-cv-04895-SHS, 65 in 1:05-cv-03500-SHS, 18 in 1:10-cv-04350-SHS, 55 in 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 344 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04575-SHS, 69 in 1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-02749-SHS, 51 in 1:04-cv-08552-SHS, 74 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 49 in 1:05-cv-03285-SHS, 56 in 1:04-cv-00929-SHS, 12 in 1:09-cv-08878-SHS, 75 in 1:04-cv-00957-SHS, 45 in 1:07-cv-04810-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 57 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-02604-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-05253-SHS, 72 in 1:04-cv-01446-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-07118-SHS, 91 in 1:04-cv-00196-SHS, 34 in 1:06-cv-15326-SHS, 66 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 189 in 1:99-cv-03658-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-03295-SHS, 75 in 1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-09649-SHS, 9 in 1:10-cv-06038-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 60 in 1:01-cv-08177-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 51 in 1:04-cv-04892-SHS, 50 in 1:04-cv-07119-SHS, 50 in 1:05-cv-08528-SHS, 53 in 1:05-cv-04761-SHS, 48 in 1:10-cv-03734-SHS, 72 in 1:02-cv-07569-SHS, 61 in 1:01-cv-02109-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 60 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 69 in 1:02-cv-08036-SHS, 59 in 1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-04894-SHS, 95 in 1:04-cv-01212-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 75 in 1:04-cv-04039-SHS, 94 in 1:04-cv-02089-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-03131-SHS, 92 in 1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 50 in 1:04-cv-07117-SHS, 50 in 1:04-cv-05256-SHS, 66 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 88 in 1:04-cv-00651-SHS, 105 in 1:01-cv-08507-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-03156-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04960-SHS, 58 in 1:04-cv-00607-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04961-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 84 in 1:04-cv-03499-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-08553-SHS, 60 in 1:03-cv-02312-SHS, 65 in 1:04-cv-00487-SHS, 50 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 71 in 1:04-cv-03093-SHS, 64 in 1:04-cv-00314-SHS, 60 in 1:04-cv-03719-SHS, 91 in 1:02-cv-02803-SHS, 38 in 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 57 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-07080-SHS, 87 in 1:04-cv-01808-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-02297-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-07621-SHS, 51 in 1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 92 in 1:04-cv-02179-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-05450-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 19 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-07116-SHS, 28 in 1:07-cv-08002-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-00154-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-02298-SHS, 65 in 1:06-cv-13095-SHS) MOTION for Settlement of Direct Purchaser Class Action.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan)
September 7, 2010 Filing 344 MOTION for Settlement of Direct Purchaser Class Action. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Settlement Agreement, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving the Settlement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 - Notice to the Class, #4 Exhibit A-2 - Claim Form, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B - Qualified Settlement Trust Agreement)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Litvin, Dan)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (43) Motion for Eric R. Hunt to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mylan in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/1/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS ***Pursuant to Chamber's instructions- this order can be processed with the 8/31/2010 file date.***(tro)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (40) Motion for William A. Rakoczy to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mylan in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/1/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS ***Pursuant to Chamber's instructions- this order can be processed with the 8/31/2010 file date.***(tro)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (42) Motion for Paul J. Molino to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mylan in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/1/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS ***Pursuant to Chamber's instructions- this order can be processed with the 8/31/2010 file date.***(tro)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (41) Motion for Deanne M. Mazzochi to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mylan in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/1/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(tro)***Pursuant to Chamber's instructions- this order can be processed with the 8/31/2010 file date.***
August 20, 2010 Filing 339 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Rhodes Technologies.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Hendler, Pablo)
August 3, 2010 Filing 338 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-07118-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting (334) Motion for Thomas A. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (22) Motion for Thomas A. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/14/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(rjm)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. granting (335) Motion for Rebecca R. Wight to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (23) Motion for Rebecca R. Wight to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-03734-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/14/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(rjm)
July 13, 2010 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #334 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #335 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 07/07/2010, Receipt Number 908180. (jd)
July 7, 2010 Filing 335 MOTION for Rebecca R. Wight to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Purdue Phama L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(rjm)
July 7, 2010 Filing 334 MOTION for Thomas A. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Phama L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Rhodes Technologies.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(rjm)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER. Subject to the approval of this Court, Plaintiffs and Actavis have stipulated and agreed that the time within which Plaintiffs shall answer, move or otherwise plead in response to Actavis' Counterclaims in this action is extended up to and including August 11, 2010. (Motions due by 8/11/2010.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/2/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(rjm)
July 1, 2010 Filing 332 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vikram Alexander Mathrani on behalf of Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Phama L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-03734-SHS(Mathrani, Vikram)
June 29, 2010 Filing 331 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Rita Halbran, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees, This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02298-SHS(rjm)
June 28, 2010 Filing 330 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma L.P. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma L.P..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02298-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
June 21, 2010 Filing 329 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Roger Williamson, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff s claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-04350-SHS(rjm)
June 17, 2010 Filing 328 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Company, The Purdue Frederick Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Company, The Purdue Frederick Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:10-cv-04350-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
June 2, 2010 Filing 327 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (rjm)
May 21, 2010 Filing 326 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Perry Ginsberg, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/20/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-08553-SHS(rjm)
May 10, 2010 Filing 325 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Nease Woodson, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/10/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-07120-SHS(rjm)
May 10, 2010 Filing 324 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Susan Burnham, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/10/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-04895-SHS(rjm)
May 6, 2010 Filing 323 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff S. Thomas Sperduto, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/6/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-08552-SHS(rjm) Modified on 5/19/2010 (rjm).
May 6, 2010 Filing 322 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Drug Mart Tallman Inc., and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00637-SHS(rjm)
May 6, 2010 Filing 321 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Derick Giwner (as Executor for Jurek Giwner), and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/6/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00607-SHS(rjm)
May 5, 2010 Filing 320 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00637-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
May 5, 2010 Filing 319 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Does, Purdue Pharma pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Does, Purdue Pharma.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-08552-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
May 5, 2010 Filing 318 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma. L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma. L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00607-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
May 5, 2010 Filing 317 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs Health Partners, Inc., Medica Health Plans, Medica Insurance Company, and Medica Health Plans of Wisconsin, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs' claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-09813-SHS(rjm)
May 4, 2010 Filing 316 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company, P.F. Laboratories Inc., PRA Holdings, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Pharma Frederick Company, P.F. Laboratories Inc., PRA Holdings, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-09813-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER. On motion of the Plaintiff, the Commonwealth of Kentucky ("the Commonwealth"), pursuant to Rule 25 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to substitute Jack Conway, the current Attorney General of the Commonwealth, for his predecessor, Gregory D. Stumbo who originally filed this action ex relatione on behalf of the Commonwealth, and the Court being sufficiently advised, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Kentucky Attorney General Jack Conway be and is substituted for his predecessor, Gregory D. Stumbo. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/28/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(rjm)
April 28, 2010 Filing 314 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff United Federation of Teachers Welfare Fund, Defendants Euroceltique S.A., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P. (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff s claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/27/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-01808-SHS(rjm)
April 26, 2010 Filing 313 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Frederick Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-01808-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
April 23, 2010 Filing 312 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs Aetna, Inc. and Humana, Inc., and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs' claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-01083-SHS(rjm)
April 22, 2010 Filing 311 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) PRA Holdings, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by PRA Holdings, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-01083-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
April 20, 2010 Filing 310 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to FRCP 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Harleysville Mutual Insurance Company, Defendants P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, and The Purdue Pharma Company (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/20/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:05-cv-04761-SHS(db)
April 16, 2010 Filing 309 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Phama L.P..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
April 16, 2010 Filing 308 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharmaceuticals LP, P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Frederick Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals LP, P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Frederick Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02749-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
April 16, 2010 Filing 307 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Ltd. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Ltd..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02297-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
April 16, 2010 Filing 306 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma LP, Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharmaceuticals LP, PF Laboratories Inc., The, Purdue Pharma Co. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma LP, Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharmaceuticals LP, PF Laboratories Inc., The, Purdue Pharma Co..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
April 12, 2010 Filing 305 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Sharon Morganti, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/12/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-07117-SHS(rjm)
April 5, 2010 Filing 304 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A., Arkansas Carpenters' Health & Welfare Fund, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00196-SHS(cd)
April 5, 2010 Filing 303 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees against the defendant(s) P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00314-SHS(cd)
April 5, 2010 Filing 302 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Euroceltique S.A., with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS(cd)
April 4, 2010 Filing 301 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00314-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
April 4, 2010 Filing 300 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Euroceltique S.A. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
April 4, 2010 Filing 299 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Abbott Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00196-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
April 1, 2010 Filing 298 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Kip Shuman (as Trustee for the Ancheta Revocable Trust for Plaintiff Laura Dzierlatka, now deceased), and the Defendants, all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/1/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS(cd)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs A.F. of L.A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, IBEW-NECA Local 505 Health and Welfare Plan, and Mechanical Contractors - UA Local 119 Welfare Plan, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs' claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/31/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00487-SHS(db) Modified on 4/13/2010 (db).
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Winthrop University Hospital, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/31/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00957-SHS(db)
March 30, 2010 Filing 295 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Fredrick Company, Euro-Celtique, S.A., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Fredrick Company, Euro-Celtique, S.A., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00957-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 30, 2010 Filing 294 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00487-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 29, 2010 Filing 293 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on REQUEST FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY ESTHER L. KLISURA AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WINTHROP UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. I was previously employed by the law firm of Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy at which time I was one of the attorneys assigned to work on the above-captioned case. My employment with the Cotchett firm ended in January, 2007. Other attorneys at the Cotchett firm continue to serve as counsel of record for plaintiff Winthrop-University Hospital along with the firms of Pomerantz Haudek Block Grossman & Gross LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP. Therefore, I respectfully request the Court relieve me as counsel for plaintiff Winthrop-University Hospital and remove me from the service list in this matter. Motions terminated: (45 in 1:04-cv-04961-SHS, 83 in 1:04-cv-00651-SHS, 91 in 1:04-cv-01212-SHS, 44 in 1:04-cv-04895-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-00154-SHS, 56 in 1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 8 in 1:09-cv-08878-SHS, 45 in 1:04-cv-04575-SHS, 65 in 1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 53 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-09649-SHS, 44 in 1:04-cv-07118-SHS, 48 in 1:04-cv-03131-SHS, 287 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 85 in 1:04-cv-00196-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 45 in 1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02298-SHS, 45 in 1:05-cv-03285-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 45 in 1:04-cv-03295-SHS, 50 in 1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 56 in 1:03-cv-02312-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02297-SHS, 47 in 1:04-cv-04892-SHS, 81 in 1:04-cv-01808-SHS, 65 in 1:02-cv-08036-SHS, 48 in 1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 71 in 1:04-cv-04039-SHS, 62 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-05256-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-07119-SHS, 45 in 1:04-cv-07117-SHS, 70 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 185 in 1:99-cv-03658-SHS, 56 in 1:01-cv-08177-SHS, 44 in 1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 56 in 1:04-cv-03719-SHS, 68 in 1:02-cv-07569-SHS, 80 in 1:04-cv-03499-SHS, 87 in 1:02-cv-02803-SHS, 51 in 1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02749-SHS, 45 in 1:04-cv-08552-SHS, 55 in 1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-03156-SHS, 50 in 1:04-cv-02604-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-00929-SHS, 68 in 1:04-cv-01446-SHS, 14 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS, 41 in 1:07-cv-04810-SHS, 101 in 1:01-cv-08507-SHS, 88 in 1:04-cv-02179-SHS, 61 in 1:05-cv-03500-SHS, 48 in 1:05-cv-04761-SHS, 48 in 1:04-cv-04894-SHS, 30 in 1:06-cv-15326-SHS, 61 in 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 44 in 1:04-cv-08553-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-00607-SHS, 45 in 1:04-cv-04960-SHS, 50 in 1:04-cv-07080-SHS, 34 in 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 51 in 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 46 in 1:05-cv-08528-SHS, 24 in 1:07-cv-08002-SHS, 71 in 1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 45 in 1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 56 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 69 in 1:04-cv-00957-SHS, 67 in 1:04-cv-03093-SHS, 88 in 1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 44 in 1:04-cv-05253-SHS, 88 in 1:04-cv-02089-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-00487-SHS, 58 in 1:04-cv-00314-SHS, 57 in 1:01-cv-02109-SHS, 44 in 1:04-cv-07621-SHS) MOTION for Esther L. Klisura to Withdraw as Attorney. filed by Winthrop-University Hospital. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(rjm)
March 29, 2010 Filing 292 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on REQUEST FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY BRUCE L. SIMON AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WINTHROP UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. I was previously a partner with the law firm of Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy at which time I was one of the attorneys assigned to work on the above-captioned case. My employment with the Cotchett firm ended in January, 2007. Other attorneys at the Cotchett firm continue to serve as counsel of record for plaintiff Winthrop-University Hospital along with the firms of Pomerantz Haudek Block Grossman & Gross LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP. Therefore, I respectfully request the Court relieve me as counsel for plaintiff Winthrop-University Hospital and remove me from the service list in this matter. Attorney Bruce Lee Simon terminated. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(rjm)
March 24, 2010 Filing 291 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Ashley Kooman, Defendants The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Co., Purdue Pharma L.P., and Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P. (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendant Abbott Laboratories ("Abbott Defendant"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/24/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-05450-SHS(rjm)
March 24, 2010 Filing 290 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Melinda Wittefeldt, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/24/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS(rjm)
March 24, 2010 Filing 289 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Cynthia Jones (as Personal Representative to the Estate of Plaintiff Archie Pressley, now deceased) and Plaintiff John Weaver, Defendants P.F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Frederick Co., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., and The Purdue Pharma Company (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs' claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/24/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-07115-SHS(rjm)
March 23, 2010 Filing 288 MOTION for Bruce L. Simon to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Winthrop-University Hospital.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Simon, Bruce)
March 23, 2010 Filing 287 MOTION for Esther L. Klisura to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Winthrop-University Hospital.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Klisura, Esther)
March 17, 2010 Filing 286 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Danielle Chaballa, Defendants P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, Inc., and Purdue Pharma, L.P. (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/17/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:05-cv-03500-SHS(rjm)
March 17, 2010 Filing 285 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Painters District Council, No. 30 Health and Welfare Fund, Defendants Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F, Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, and The Purdue Pharma Company (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/17/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02078-SHS(rjm)
March 17, 2010 Filing 284 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs Robert Williams and Clifford Perry, Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma. L.P., The P.F. Laboratories Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, and The Purdue Pharma Company (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendant Abbott Laboratories ("Abbott Defendant"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs' claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/17/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-07080-SHS(rjm)
March 17, 2010 Filing 283 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Jane Schooley, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/17/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-04962-SHS(rjm)
March 17, 2010 Filing 282 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Betts Tully, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff s claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/17/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-04961-SHS(rjm)
March 16, 2010 Filing 281 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Abbott Laboratories, The P.F. Labpratories Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Labpratories Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-07080-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 16, 2010 Filing 280 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.,, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:05-cv-03500-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 16, 2010 Filing 279 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02078-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 16, 2010 Filing 278 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Adam Nathanson, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/16/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS(rjm)
March 16, 2010 Filing 277 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs Utica Mutual Insurance Co., Graphic Arts Mutual Insurance Co. and Republic-Franklin Insurance Co., Defendants The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma L.P, The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., and P.F. Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/16/10) (rjm)
March 15, 2010 Filing 276 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/15/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS(rjm)
March 15, 2010 Filing 275 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Man-U Service Contract Fund, and Steven Bennett, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs' claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/12/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00112-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 274 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiffs Mark Klein, Health Care for All, and Carol Puerling, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs' claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/12/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03132-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 273 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PRE.JUDlCE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company d/b/a BlueCross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Defendants Euroceltique. S.A., Purdue Pharma. L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, and The Purdue Pharma Company (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"). and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories. Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/12/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 272 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Michael Lissy, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/12/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02378-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 271 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Bob Schecher, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 270 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Martin Ayala, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-04960-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 269 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Vasken Aznavorian, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 268 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Paper, Allied Industrial, Chemical and Energy Workers International Union, ALF-CIO, CLC, Defendants Euroceltique S.A., P.F. Laboratories. Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Company, and Purdue Pharma, L.P. (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00315-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 267 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Gary Jaffe, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00929-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 266 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Vista Healthplan, Defendants Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company. and The Purdue Pharma Company (collectively. "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories. and Abbott Laboratories. Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action. with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02179-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 265 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Roy Charles May, Defendants The PF Laboratories Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Co., Purdue Pharma LP, and Purdue Pharmaceuticals LP (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff's claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-07119-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 264 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals LP, PF Lab Inc., Purdue Pharma Co., Purdue Pharma LP pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals LP, PF Lab Inc., Purdue Pharma Co., Purdue Pharma LP.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 12, 2010 Filing 263 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Local 1199 National Benefit Fund for Health and Human Services Employees, Defendants Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, and The Purdue Pharma Company (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03093-SHS(rjm)
March 12, 2010 Filing 262 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., P.F. Laboratories, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc..(Hester, Timothy)
March 11, 2010 Filing 261 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Fredrick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Fredrick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00112-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 11, 2010 Filing 260 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Fredrick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Fredrick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00112-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 11, 2010 Filing 259 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Fredrick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Fredrick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00112-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 11, 2010 Filing 258 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Euroceltique, S.A., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Euroceltique, S.A., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 11, 2010 Filing 257 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 9, 2010 Filing 256 STATUS REPORT. Letter Apprising Court of Recent Developments Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, PF Lab Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Purdue Pharma, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company.(Hester, Timothy)
March 9, 2010 Filing 255 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Phama L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Euroceltique S.A. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02179-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 9, 2010 Filing 254 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Euroceltique S.A. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03093-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 9, 2010 Filing 253 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Company, Abbott Laboratories, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Fredrick Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Fredrick Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00315-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 9, 2010 Filing 252 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-02378-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 9, 2010 Filing 251 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Fredrick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Fredrick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 9, 2010 Filing 250 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Frederick Co., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., P. F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma Co. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Frederick Co., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., P. F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma Co..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03132-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 9, 2010 Filing 249 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Frederick Co., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., P. F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma Co. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Frederick Co., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., P. F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma Co..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03132-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 9, 2010 Filing 248 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Frederick Co., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., P. F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma Co. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Frederick Co., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., P. F. Laboratories Inc., Purdue Pharma Co..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03132-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 9, 2010 Filing 247 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00929-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
March 8, 2010 Filing 246 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Faye Friedman, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff s claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-04575-SHS(rjm)
March 8, 2010 Filing 245 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Carolyn LeMaster, Defendants P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Co., Purdue Pharma, L.P., and Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. (collectively, "Purdue Defendants"), and Defendants Abbott Laboratories, and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (collectively, "Abbott Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff s claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-05256-SHS(rjm)
March 8, 2010 Filing 244 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Kay Burse, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff s claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-04892-SHS(rjm)
March 8, 2010 Filing 243 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Mariah Jolly, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:05-cv-08528-SHS(rjm)
March 8, 2010 Filing 242 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Connecticut Citizen Action Group, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiffs claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-03131-SHS(rjm)
March 8, 2010 Filing 241 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Brian Lynn, and the Defendants, by and through their undersigned counsel of record and representing all parties to the action, stipulate to the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of this action, with each party to bear its own fees and costs, including attorneys' fees. This stipulation of dismissal shall be res judicata against each party as to all aspects of Plaintiff s claims. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-04893-SHS(rjm)
November 25, 2009 Filing 240 RESPONSE in Support re: (227 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION Status Conference of Direct Purchaser Class and Non-Class Plaintiffs., (197 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION JOINT MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Pike County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Thomas, Tad)
October 27, 2009 Filing 239 JOINDER to join re: (11 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS) Response to Motion,. Document filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Abbot Laboratories.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Hartmere, Michael)
October 27, 2009 Filing 238 RESPONSE to Motion re: (235 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 9 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS) MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
October 27, 2009 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (235 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 9 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS) MOTION to Remand to State Court.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Kentucky. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Thomas, Tad)
October 27, 2009 Filing 235 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Kentucky.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Thomas, Tad)
October 26, 2009 Filing 237 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Pharma Company against Euroceltique S.A., and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. settling action. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/23/09) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:01-cv-08507-SHS, 1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:03-cv-02312-SHS(ml)
October 26, 2009 Filing 234 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., and The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. against Apotex Corp., and Apotex Inc. settling the action (07 cv 8002). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/23/09) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-08002-SHS(ml)
October 22, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Michael Hartmere to RE-FILE Document (8 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS) Joinder. ERROR(S): A document cannot be linked to a filing error. NOTE: First, the motion must be re-filed, then, responding documents can be linked to the motion. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(jar)
October 22, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Timothy Hester to RE-FILE Document (232 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 7 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS) Response to Motion. ERROR(S): A document cannot be linked to a filing error. NOTE: First, the motion needs to be re-filed, then, responding documents can be linked to the motion. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(jar) Modified on 10/23/2009 (jar).
October 22, 2009 Filing 233 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - JOINDER to join re: (7 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS) Response to Motion,. Document filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Abbot Laboratories.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Hartmere, Michael) Modified on 10/23/2009 (jar).
October 22, 2009 Filing 232 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RESPONSE to Motion re: (6 in 1:08-cv-03380-SHS) MOTION to Remand to State Court. . Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:08-cv-03380-SHS(Hester, Timothy) Modified on 10/23/2009 (jar).
October 21, 2009 Filing 231 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #227 MOTION Status Conference of Direct Purchaser Class and Non-Class Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma Company. (Hester, Timothy)
October 15, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Tad Thomas to RE-FILE Document #230 MOTION to Remand.. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents must be filed individually. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support found under event list Replies, Oppositions, Supporting Documents. NOTE: The Motion must be correctly re-filed. (jar)
October 15, 2009 Filing 230 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Remand. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Thomas, Tad) Modified on 10/16/2009 (jar).
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marc Owen Sheridan terminated in case 1:04-cv-00112-SHS; granting (225) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marc Owen Sheridan terminated in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/6/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00112-SHS(jmi)
August 14, 2009 Filing 228 RESPONSE to Motion re: #227 MOTION Status Conference of Direct Purchaser Class and Non-Class Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma Company. (Hester, Timothy)
July 31, 2009 Filing 227 MOTION Status Conference of Direct Purchaser Class and Non-Class Plaintiffs. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., SAJ Distributors, Inc., Stephen LaFrance Holdings, Inc., Walgreen Co., Eckerd Corporation, The Kroger Co., Neighborcare, Inc., Albertson's. Inc., American Sales Co., Inc., Maxi Drug, Inc., Care Pharmacies, Inc., Medic Drug Inc..(Perwin, Scott)
July 29, 2009 Filing 226 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Edmund W. Searby on behalf of Medic Drug Inc.. New Address: McDonald Hopkins LLC, 600 Superior Avenue, East, Suite 2100, Cleveland, OH, USA 44114, (216) 348-5400. (Searby, Edmund)
June 25, 2009 Filing 225 MOTION for Marc O. Sheridan to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund, Man-U Service Contract Fund, Steven Bennett.(Sheridan, Marc)
June 23, 2009 Filing 224 CONSENT JUDGMENT between Purdue Pharma I.P., the P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, the Purdue Pharma Company and Euro-Celtique S.A. AND KV Pharmaceutical Company settling the action as to KV Pharmaceutical Company. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/22/09) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(ml)
May 26, 2009 Filing 223 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth J Atlas on behalf of KV Pharmaceutical Company, KV Pharmaceutical Co. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(Atlas, Seth)
May 26, 2009 Filing 222 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Francis Sweeney on behalf of KV Pharmaceutical Company, KV Pharmaceutical Co. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(Sweeney, John)
May 26, 2009 Filing 221 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John Francis Sweeney on behalf of KV Pharmaceutical Company, KV Pharmaceutical Co.. New Address: Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP, 3 World Financial Center, New York, New York, USA 10281, 212-415-8600. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(Sweeney, John)
May 21, 2009 Filing 220 CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PURDUE PHARMA L.P., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., AND PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P. AND ACTAVIS TOTOWA LLC settling action. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/21/09) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(ml)
May 20, 2009 Filing 219 CONSENT JUDGMENT between Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. and Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Mallinckrodt Inc.. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/19/09) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS(ml)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION AND ORDER to accept judgment. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/19/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-08002-SHS(ml)
April 7, 2009 Filing 217 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tad Thomas on behalf of Commonwealth of Kentucky (Thomas, Tad)
March 27, 2009 Filing 216 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Richard A. Inz. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS, 1:07-cv-08002-SHS(Inz, Richard)
January 5, 2009 Filing 215 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert J. Goldman on behalf of Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharama Company. New Address: Ropes & Gray LLP, 1900 University Avenue 6th floor, East Palo Alto, CA, 94303, 650-617-4000. (Goldman, Robert)
October 1, 2008 Filing 214 NOTICE of Firm Name Change. Document filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. (Wexler, Kenneth)
June 5, 2008 Filing 213 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Colbert Hartmere on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. New Address: Venable LLP, 750 E. Pratt Street, Suite 900, Baltimore, Maryland, USA 21202, (410) 244-7400. (Hartmere, Michael)
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER ON MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE in case 1:01-cv-02109-SHS; granting (211) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Diane E. Lifton and Allison Beth Neidoff terminated in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/17/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(rjm)
April 16, 2008 Filing 211 MOTION for Diane E. Lifton to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc..(Hartmere, Michael)
April 11, 2008 Filing 209 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Colbert Hartmere on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Hartmere, Michael)
April 7, 2008 Filing 210 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the Eastern District of Kentucky, C.A. No. 7:07-222 and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Sidney H. Stein, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/4/08) (rjm)
April 2, 2008 Filing 208 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (41 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS) MOTION to Set Aside the Stay of the Patent Issues., (203 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION to Set Aside the Stay of the Patent Issues. with Certificate of Service. Document filed by Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Totowa L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(Landmon, Chad)
March 28, 2008 Filing 207 RESPONSE to Motion re: #203 MOTION to Set Aside the Stay of the Patent Issues.. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A.. (Goldman, Robert)
March 17, 2008 Filing 206 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (46 in 1:04-cv-09649-SHS) MOTION JOINT MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., SAJ Distributors, Inc., Stephen LaFrance Holdings, Inc., Walgreen Co., Eckerd Corporation, American Sales Co., Inc., Maxi Drug, Inc., The Kroger Co., Neighborcare, Inc., Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., SAJ Distributors, Inc., Stephen LaFrance Holdings, Inc., Albertson's. Inc., Care Pharmacies, Inc., Medic Drug Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Care Pharmacies, Inc., Albertson's, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Safeway Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Perwin, Scott)
March 17, 2008 Filing 205 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (35 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 197 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION JOINT MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY.. Document filed by Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Totowa L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(Landmon, Chad)
March 17, 2008 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DOCUMENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Chad Landmon to RE-FILE Document #201 Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion. Use the document type Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion found under the document list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (KA)
March 14, 2008 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (41 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS) MOTION to Set Aside the Stay of the Patent Issues.. Document filed by Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Totowa L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(Landmon, Chad)
March 14, 2008 Filing 203 MOTION to Set Aside the Stay of the Patent Issues. Document filed by Actavis Totowa LLC.(Landmon, Chad)
March 7, 2008 Filing 202 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (38 in 1:04-cv-04961-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-02604-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07118-SHS, 61 in 1:04-cv-01446-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02297-SHS, 94 in 1:01-cv-08507-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-00487-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-00314-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07621-SHS, 82 in 1:04-cv-02089-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-09649-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 42 in 1:05-cv-04761-SHS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02298-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04575-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-07117-SHS, 53 in 1:05-cv-03500-SHS, 45 in 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 49 in 1:03-cv-02312-SHS, 64 in 1:04-cv-04039-SHS, 15 in 1:07-cv-08002-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 30 in 1:07-cv-04810-SHS, 51 in 1:01-cv-02109-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-03093-SHS, 62 in 1:02-cv-07569-SHS, 51 in 1:04-cv-05450-SHS, 79 in 1:04-cv-00196-SHS, 48 in 1:04-cv-03156-SHS, 83 in 1:04-cv-01212-SHS, 40 in 1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 40 in 1:04-cv-04892-SHS, 50 in 1:01-cv-08177-SHS, 59 in 1:02-cv-08036-SHS, 197 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-07080-SHS, 23 in 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04960-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04895-SHS, 38 in 1:05-cv-03285-SHS, 50 in 1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 80 in 1:04-cv-02179-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-08553-SHS, 81 in 1:02-cv-02803-SHS, 24 in 1:06-cv-15326-SHS, 44 in 1:04-cv-00929-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-03719-SHS, 39 in 1:05-cv-08528-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-03295-SHS, 45 in 1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 41 in 1:04-cv-04894-SHS, 48 in 1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 47 in 1:04-cv-00154-SHS, 179 in 1:99-cv-03658-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-00607-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-05256-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07116-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-00957-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 77 in 1:04-cv-00651-SHS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02749-SHS, 47 in 1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 41 in 1:04-cv-03131-SHS, 35 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 80 in 1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 75 in 1:04-cv-01808-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-07119-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-08552-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-05253-SHS, 74 in 1:04-cv-03499-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 54 in 1:06-cv-13095-SHS) MOTION JOINT MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Phama L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Hester, Timothy)
March 7, 2008 Filing 201 FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (35 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 197 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION JOINT MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY. with Certificate of Service. Document filed by Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Totowa L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(Landmon, Chad) Modified on 3/17/2008 (KA).
February 22, 2008 Filing 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Joint Motion to Lift Stay and supporting papers served on Attorneys of Record on 2/22/2008. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Gerstein, Bruce)
February 22, 2008 Filing 199 DECLARATION of Bruce E. Gerstein in Support re: (38 in 1:04-cv-04961-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-02604-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07118-SHS, 61 in 1:04-cv-01446-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02297-SHS, 94 in 1:01-cv-08507-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-00487-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-00314-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07621-SHS, 82 in 1:04-cv-02089-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-09649-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 42 in 1:05-cv-04761-SHS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02298-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04575-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-07117-SHS, 53 in 1:05-cv-03500-SHS, 45 in 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 49 in 1:03-cv-02312-SHS, 64 in 1:04-cv-04039-SHS, 15 in 1:07-cv-08002-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 30 in 1:07-cv-04810-SHS, 51 in 1:01-cv-02109-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-03093-SHS, 62 in 1:02-cv-07569-SHS, 51 in 1:04-cv-05450-SHS, 79 in 1:04-cv-00196-SHS, 48 in 1:04-cv-03156-SHS, 83 in 1:04-cv-01212-SHS, 40 in 1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 40 in 1:04-cv-04892-SHS, 50 in 1:01-cv-08177-SHS, 59 in 1:02-cv-08036-SHS, 197 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-07080-SHS, 23 in 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04960-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04895-SHS, 38 in 1:05-cv-03285-SHS, 50 in 1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 80 in 1:04-cv-02179-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-08553-SHS, 81 in 1:02-cv-02803-SHS, 24 in 1:06-cv-15326-SHS, 44 in 1:04-cv-00929-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-03719-SHS, 39 in 1:05-cv-08528-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-03295-SHS, 45 in 1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 41 in 1:04-cv-04894-SHS, 48 in 1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 47 in 1:04-cv-00154-SHS, 179 in 1:99-cv-03658-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-00607-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-05256-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07116-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-00957-SHS, 77 in 1:04-cv-00651-SHS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02749-SHS, 47 in 1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 41 in 1:04-cv-03131-SHS, 35 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 80 in 1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 75 in 1:04-cv-01808-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-07119-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-08552-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-05253-SHS, 74 in 1:04-cv-03499-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 54 in 1:06-cv-13095-SHS) MOTION JOINT MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Gerstein, Bruce)
February 22, 2008 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (38 in 1:04-cv-04961-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-02604-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07118-SHS, 61 in 1:04-cv-01446-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02297-SHS, 94 in 1:01-cv-08507-SHS, 53 in 1:04-cv-00487-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-00314-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07621-SHS, 82 in 1:04-cv-02089-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-09649-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 42 in 1:05-cv-04761-SHS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02298-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04575-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-01014-SHS, 52 in 1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-07117-SHS, 53 in 1:05-cv-03500-SHS, 45 in 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-00327-SHS, 49 in 1:03-cv-02312-SHS, 64 in 1:04-cv-04039-SHS, 15 in 1:07-cv-08002-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-00229-SHS, 30 in 1:07-cv-04810-SHS, 51 in 1:01-cv-02109-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-04574-SHS, 59 in 1:04-cv-03093-SHS, 62 in 1:02-cv-07569-SHS, 51 in 1:04-cv-05450-SHS, 79 in 1:04-cv-00196-SHS, 48 in 1:04-cv-03156-SHS, 83 in 1:04-cv-01212-SHS, 40 in 1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 55 in 1:04-cv-01354-SHS, 40 in 1:04-cv-04892-SHS, 50 in 1:01-cv-08177-SHS, 59 in 1:02-cv-08036-SHS, 197 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-07080-SHS, 23 in 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04960-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04895-SHS, 38 in 1:05-cv-03285-SHS, 50 in 1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 80 in 1:04-cv-02179-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-08553-SHS, 81 in 1:02-cv-02803-SHS, 24 in 1:06-cv-15326-SHS, 44 in 1:04-cv-00929-SHS, 49 in 1:04-cv-03719-SHS, 39 in 1:05-cv-08528-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-03295-SHS, 45 in 1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 54 in 1:04-cv-00494-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 41 in 1:04-cv-04894-SHS, 48 in 1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 47 in 1:04-cv-00154-SHS, 179 in 1:99-cv-03658-SHS, 46 in 1:04-cv-00607-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-05256-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-07116-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-00957-SHS, 63 in 1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 77 in 1:04-cv-00651-SHS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02749-SHS, 47 in 1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 41 in 1:04-cv-03131-SHS, 35 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 80 in 1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 75 in 1:04-cv-01808-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-07119-SHS, 39 in 1:04-cv-08552-SHS, 38 in 1:04-cv-05253-SHS, 74 in 1:04-cv-03499-SHS, 42 in 1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 54 in 1:06-cv-13095-SHS) MOTION JOINT MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Gerstein, Bruce)
February 22, 2008 Filing 197 MOTION JOINT MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Gerstein, Bruce)
January 18, 2008 Filing 196 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C Building Trades Welfare Plan, IBEW-NECA Local 505 Health & Welfare Plan, Mechanical Contractors-UA Local 119 Welfare Plan. (Geribon, Hector)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER # 95589... defendants have failed to show by clear and convincing evidence that Purdue committed inequitable conduct before the PTO, and therefore the patents-in-suit will not be deemed unenforceable on that basis. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/7/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(rjm) Modified on 1/8/2008 (rjm).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATED ORDER that all proceedings related to defendants' antitrust counterclaims are stayed until further order of the Court, consistent with the stay entered on 3/30/06 in MDL Order No. 2. All other proceedings are stayed until further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/21/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-08002-SHS(rjm)
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER that Oral Argument on whether Purdue engaged in inequitable conduct in procuring the patents in suit set for 12/20/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/10/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(rjm)
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting (183) Motion to Supplement the Record on the Enforceability of its Patents. Having considered the submissions of Purdue and with no opposition having been made... the Court concludes that Purdue's motion should be granted. The following documents are admitted into evidence: Remand Exhibit 1. Remand Exhibit 2, a copy of the cover and pages 1-4, 115-24 from the 8/31/07 deposition of Dr. Robert F. Kaiki. Remand Exhibit 3 a copy of an article by Robert F. Kaiko... Remand Exhibit 4, a copy of a monograph published by the American Pain Society... Remand Exhibit 5, a copy of an article by Eisenach etal... Remand Exhibit 6, an excerpt from the Notification of Transmittal of the International Search Report... Remand Exhibit 7, a copy of pages 1 and 165 of the 8/14/02 deposition of Robert F. Reder, M.D... Remand Exhibit 8, a copy of pages 1, 3, 5-7, and 16-17 of the 6/14/02deposition of Ronald Kaplan, M.D...Remand Exhibit 9, a copy of pages 1, 3, 5-7, and 18-19 of the 6/14/02 deposition of Ronald Kaplan... Remand Exhibit 10, a copy of Cancer Pain Relief, World Health Organization Geneva (2d ed. 1996). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(rjm) Modified on 12/3/2007 (rjm).
November 26, 2007 Filing 191 REPLY re: (11 in 1:07-cv-08002-SHS, 11 in 1:07-cv-08002-SHS) Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Purdue's Reply to the Counterclaims Set Forth in Defendants Apotex, Inc.'s and Apotex Corp.'s Answers, Defenses and Counterclaims. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-08002-SHS(Inz, Richard)
October 19, 2007 Filing 190 BRIEF re: (45 in 1:06-cv-13095-SHS) Brief,,,,, (44 in 1:06-cv-13095-SHS) Brief, REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by Mallinckrodt Inc.. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF CASEY B. HOWARD#2 Exhibit 49#3 Exhibit 50#4 Exhibit 51#5 Exhibit 52#6 Exhibit 53#7 Exhibit 54#8 Exhibit 55#9 Exhibit 56#10 Exhibit 57#11 Exhibit 58#12 Exhibit 59#13 Exhibit 60#14 Exhibit 61)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(Howard, Casey)
October 19, 2007 Filing 188 BRIEF re: (175 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Brief, (183 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION Supplement the Record re: (182) Brief, (Associated Cases 1:07 Civ. 03972 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 03973 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 04810 SHS, 1:06 Civ. 13095 SHS). MOTION Supplement the Record re: (182) Brief, (Associated Cases 1:07 Civ. 03972 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 03973 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 04810 SHS, 1:06 Civ. 13095 SHS)., (182 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Brief, Reply Brief of KV Pharmaceuticals In Support Of Its Contention That Purdue's U.S. Patent Nos. 5,549,912, 5,508,042, And 5,656,295 Are Unenforceable Because Of Purdue's Inequitable Conduct. Document filed by KV Pharmaceutical Company, KV Pharmaceutical Co..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(Sweeney, John)
October 18, 2007 Filing 187 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Address. Document filed by Winthrop University Hospital, Arkansas Carpenters' Health & Welfare Fund, Winthrop-University Hospital, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company. (Persky, Bernard)
October 18, 2007 Filing 186 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert T. Rhoad on behalf of Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. New Address: Crowell & Moring LLP, 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC, United States 20004-2595, (202) 624-2545. (Rhoad, Robert)
October 12, 2007 Filing 185 DECLARATION of Richard A. Inz in Support re: #183 MOTION Supplement the Record re: #182 Brief, (Associated Cases 1:07 Civ. 03972 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 03973 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 04810 SHS, 1:06 Civ. 13095 SHS). MOTION Supplement the Record re: #182 Brief, (Associated Cases 1:07 Civ. 03972 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 03973 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 04810 SHS, 1:06 Civ. 13095 SHS).. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., The Purdue Pharama Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit 1#10 Exhibit 2#11 Exhibit 3#12 Exhibit 4#13 Exhibit 5#14 Exhibit 6#15 Exhibit 7#16 Exhibit 8#17 Exhibit 9#18 Exhibit 10)(Goldman, Robert)
October 12, 2007 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #183 MOTION Supplement the Record re: #182 Brief, (Associated Cases 1:07 Civ. 03972 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 03973 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 04810 SHS, 1:06 Civ. 13095 SHS). MOTION Supplement the Record re: #182 Brief, (Associated Cases 1:07 Civ. 03972 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 03973 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 04810 SHS, 1:06 Civ. 13095 SHS).. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., The Purdue Pharama Company. (Goldman, Robert)
October 12, 2007 Filing 183 MOTION Supplement the Record re: #182 Brief, (Associated Cases 1:07 Civ. 03972 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 03973 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 04810 SHS, 1:06 Civ. 13095 SHS). Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., The Purdue Pharama Company.(Goldman, Robert)
October 12, 2007 Filing 182 BRIEF re: #176 Brief, on the Enforceability of the Patents in Suit (Associated Cases 1:07 Civ. 03972 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 03973 SHS, 1:07 Civ. 04810 SHS, 1:06 Civ. 13095 SHS). Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Frederick Company, Euroceltique S.A..(Goldman, Robert)
October 4, 2007 Filing 181 NOTICE of Notice of Firm Name Change. Document filed by Mallinckrodt Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(Feder, Scott)
October 3, 2007 Filing 180 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard B. Drubel on behalf of Care Pharmacies, Inc., Care Pharmacies, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS et al.(Drubel, Richard)
September 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER that the Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel [Doc. No. 58 in 04cv1446] on behalf of Eckerd Corporation and Maxi-Drug, Inc. d/b/a Brooks Pharmacy, is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/27/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-01446-SHS(rjm)
September 21, 2007 Filing 177 BRIEF re: (176 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Brief, DECLARATION OF CASEY B. HOWARD IN SUPPORT OF MALLINCKRODT'S BRIEF ON THE UNENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 5,549,912, 5,656,295, AND 5,508,042 DUE TO INEQUITABLE CONUDCT. Document filed by Mallinckrodt Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2 (PART 1)#3 Exhibit 2 (PART 2)#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8#10 Exhibit 9#11 Exhibit 10#12 Exhibit 11#13 Exhibit 12#14 Exhibit 13#15 Exhibit 14#16 Exhibit 15#17 Exhibit 16#18 Exhibit 17#19 Exhibit 18#20 Exhibit 19#21 Exhibit 20#22 Exhibit 21#23 Exhibit 22#24 Exhibit 23#25 Exhibit 24#26 Exhibit 25#27 Exhibit 26#28 Exhibit 27 (PART 1)#29 Exhibit 27 (PART 2)#30 Exhibit 27 (PART 3)#31 Exhibit 28#32 Exhibit 29#33 Exhibit 30#34 Exhibit 31#35 Exhibit 32#36 Exhibit 33#37 Exhibit 34#38 Exhibit 35#39 Exhibit 36#40 Exhibit 37#41 Exhibit 38#42 Exhibit 39 (PART 1)#43 Exhibit 39 (PART 2)#44 Exhibit 39 (PART 3)#45 Exhibit 40 (PART 1)#46 Exhibit 40 (PART 2)#47 Exhibit 41 (PART 1)#48 Exhibit 41 (PART 2)#49 Exhibit 42#50 Exhibit 43#51 Exhibit 44#52 Exhibit 45#53 Exhibit 46#54 Exhibit 47#55 Exhibit 48)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(Howard, Casey)
September 21, 2007 Filing 176 BRIEF ON THE UNENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 5,549,912, 5,656,295, AND 5,508,042 DUE TO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT. Document filed by Mallinckrodt Inc..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(Howard, Casey)
September 21, 2007 Filing 175 BRIEF Of KV Pharmaceutical Company In Support Of Its Contention That Purdue's U.S. Patent Nos. 5,549,912, 5,508,042 And 5,656,295 Are Unenforceable Because Of Purdue's Inequitable Conduct. Document filed by KV Pharmaceutical Company, KV Pharmaceutical Co..Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(Sweeney, John)
September 11, 2007 Filing 174 NOTICE of Firm Name Change. Document filed by Medic Drug Inc.. (Burke, Christopher)
September 4, 2007 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (22 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 173 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(rjm)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Jonathan A. Harris for Actavis Totowa L.L.C. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/31/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(rjm)
September 4, 2007 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (21 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 172 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(rjm)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Denise V. Zamore for Actavis Totowa L.L.C. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/31/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(rjm)
September 4, 2007 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (20 in 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 171 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(rjm)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Stacie L. Ropka for Actavis Totowa L.L.C. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/31/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS(rjm)
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER (This document relates to: 06 cv 13095; 07 cv 3972; 07 cv 3973; 07 cv 4810); Defts' opening briefs on the issue of inequitable conduct are due by 9/21/2007. Purdue's response is due by 10/12/2007. Defts' reply, if any, are due by 10/19/2007. The opening and responsive briefing shall not exceed 40 pages; replies shall not exceed 25 pages. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(sn)
August 22, 2007 Filing 169 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marvin A. Miller on behalf of Painters District Council No. 30 Health and Welfare Plan. New Address: Miller Law LLC, 115 S. LaSalle Street, Suite 2910, Chicago, IL, 60603, 312-332-3400. (Miller, Marvin)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney S. Stein from Andrea L. Wryda dated 8/10/07 re: Pursuant to your Order of 8/7/07, Deft. K.V. Pharmaceutical Co. identifies the following Qualified Persons purs. to the Stipulated Protective Order entered on 8/8/07: Paragrapg 7(e): Gregory S. Bentley, Esq., Carl G. Hintmann, Esq.; Paragraph 8(e): Gregory S. Bentley, Esq., Carl S. Hintmann, Esq. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(rjm)
August 8, 2007 Filing 167 UNSIGNED PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER RULE 26(c)...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(rjm)
August 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 166 PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER RULE 26(c)...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/7/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(rjm)
August 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER... The Court finds that KV's objections to Purdue's proposed protective order - which was signed by Purdue and Mallinckrodt on 7/26/07 and agreed to by Actavis in its July 30, 2007 letter - lack merit. Therefore, the Court intends to sign the protective order agreed upon by Purdue, Mallinckrodt, and Actavis as the Protective Order governing the actions listed and binding all parties to those litigations. KV will name any "Qualified Persons" as described in the Protective Order paragraph 7(e), 8(e) via letter application, with notice to all parties, by 8/10/07. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/7/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(rjm)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER that All proceedings related to defendants' antitrust counterclaims are stayed until further order of the Court, consistent with the stay entered on 3/30/06 in MDL Order No. 2. All proceedings related to plaintiffs' claims of infringement and defendants' claims that plaintiffs' patents-in-suit are invalid are stayed until further order of the Court; Subject to the parties agreeing to the terms of a protective order, plaintiffs shall produce to defendants by 8/10/07 copies of the trial and discovery record in Endo and the discovery record and preliminary injunction hearing record in Boehringer. The materials to be produced shall include, inter alia, all documents relating to the drafting and prosecution of the patents-in-suit and all deposition transcripts of those individuals involved in the drafting and prosecution of the patents-in-suit. Plaintiffs will produce these materials to defendant Mallinckrodt Inc. in the action 06cv13095(SHS) on an "outside counsel only" basis until a protective order is entered by the Court. Discovery due by 9/14/2007., there will be a Status Conference set for 8/23/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein to establish a briefing schedule on the issue of inequitable conduct... and as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/27/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-13095-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS, 1:07-cv-04810-SHS(rjm)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Hugh L. Moore dated 7/9/07 re: Mr. Normile requests the Court's permission to have counsel for the parties in Purdue's action against Mallinckrodt attend the 7/12/07 pretrial conference... ENDORSEMENT: The Court desires Mallinckrodt's presence at and participation in the July 12 pretrial conference, Mallinckrodt will appear. So Ordered. This Document relates to 04md1603 and 06-13095. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/10/07) (rjm)
July 10, 2007 Filing 162 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Robert G. Eisler, New Attorney: David S. Stellings, Address: Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP, 780 Third Avenue, 48th Fl., New York, NY, USA 10017, 212-355-9500. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C Building Trades Welfare Plan, IBEW-NECA Local 505 Health & Welfare Plan, Mechanical Contractors-UA Local 119 Welfare Plan. (Stellings, David)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER ENDORSEMENT ON NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL that Russel N. Jacobson hereby withdraws as counsel of record for Plaintiff Winthrop-University Hospital in both matters 04MD1603(SHS) and 04CV957(SHS). Plaintiff Winthrop-University Hospital will continue to be represented by Pomerantz Haudek Block Grossman & Gross LLP in the foregoing actions. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/9/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00957-SHS(rjm)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER ON WRITTEN MOTION ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Andrea L. Wayda for KV Pharmaceutical Co. admitted Pro Hac Vice. This Document relates to 07-3972, 07-3973 and 07-4810. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/9/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS(rjm)
July 5, 2007 Filing 159 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A..(Inz, Richard)
July 5, 2007 Filing 158 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Craig Sunshine on behalf of KV Pharmaceutical Company (Sunshine, Steven)
July 3, 2007 Filing 157 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Winthrop-University Hospital. (Jacobson, Russel)
June 28, 2007 Filing 156 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Linda P. Nussbaum on behalf of Meijer, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc.. New Address: Kaplan, Fox & Kilsheimer, LLP, 850 Third Avenue, 14th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10022, 212-687-1980. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00494-SHS(Nussbaum, Linda)
June 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER... that further briefing with respect to Purdue's Motion to Dismiss All Patent-Related Claims and Counterclaims for lack of Case or Controversy is hereby stayed until further order of the Court. Two previous requests for extension have been made with respect to the above identified motion. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/22/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:99-cv-03658-SHS(rjm)
June 15, 2007 Filing 154 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in support of Purdue's Motion to Dismiss Rite Aid and Safeway's Complaints. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., P.F. Laboratories, Inc..(Inz, Richard)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER that there will be a Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2007 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/13/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:07-cv-03972-SHS, 1:07-cv-03973-SHS. Also relates to 07cv4810(SHS). (rjm)
June 13, 2007 Filing 152 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc..(Inz, Richard)
May 25, 2007 Filing 151 CONSENT JUDGMENT, In favor of Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharama Company, The Purdue Pharma Company against Euroceltique S.A., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc.. This consent judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 68 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and this action is hereby dismissed without costs or attorney fees, save that this District Court shall retain jurisdiction over this action, including without limitation. over implementation of, or disputes arising out of, this Consent Judgment ot the settlment of this action. A prevailing party shall be entitled to recover attorney fees in any such proceeding occurring after the entering of this Consent Judgment in which the case is found to be an exceptional one. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 05/25//2007) (dt)
May 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Endorsement on Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance... granting permission to withdraw the appearance of Francis H. Morrison III, along with the appearances of attorneys, Matthew J. Becker and Catherine Dugan O'Connor on behalf of the defendants, Purdue Pharma Co., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Frederick Co., and P.F. Lab Inc. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/20/07) (rjm)
May 22, 2007 Filing 150 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-3)... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Delaware, C.A. No. 1:07-32 and C.A. No. 1:07-77, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Sidney H. Stein, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/1/07) (rjm)
May 21, 2007 Filing 148 MOTION for Francis H. Morrison III, Matthew J. Becker, Catherine Dugan O'Connor to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Frederick Company, PF Lab Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Purdue Pharma Company.(Morrison, Francis)
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 99cv3658); the time for Boehringer defendants to serve and file their opposition to Purdue's motion to dismiss all patent-related claims and counterclaims for lack of case or controversy is extended to and including 6/22/2007; Purdue's time to serve and file their reply papers in support of the motion is extended to and including 7/11/2007. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/15/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:99-cv-03658-SHS(kkc)
April 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING PURDUE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF granting (139) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (26) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:06-cv-15304-SHS; granting (12) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:06-cv-15326-SHS... Safeway and Rite-Aid may file a response by 4/27/07 if they see fit to do so.. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 1:06-cv-15326-SHS(rjm)
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING PTFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY BRIEF in case 1:04-md-01603-SHS; granting (27) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:06-cv-15304-SHS. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 1:06-cv-15326-SHS(rjm)
April 13, 2007 Filing 144 OPPOSITION BRIEF Purdue's Opposition to Resellers' Motion For Leave To Submit Sur-Reply Brief And Purdue's Response to Sur-Reply. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma Company.(Inz, Richard)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (140 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) MOTION to Dismiss All Patent-Related Claims And Counterclaims For Lack Of Case Or Controversy. : Response extended due by 5/23/2007 (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/12/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:99-cv-03658-SHS(rjm)
April 5, 2007 Filing 142 DECLARATION of Richard A. Inz in Support re: #140 MOTION to Dismiss All Patent-Related Claims And Counterclaims For Lack Of Case Or Controversy.. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1#2 Exhibit Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit Ex. 3#4 Exhibit Ex. 4#5 Exhibit Ex. 5#6 Exhibit Ex. 6#7 Exhibit Ex. 7#8 Exhibit Ex. 8#9 Exhibit Ex. 9#10 Exhibit Ex. 10#11 Exhibit Ex. 11#12 Exhibit Ex. 12#13 Exhibit Ex. 13#14 Errata Ex. 14#15 Exhibit Ex. 15#16 Exhibit Ex. 16#17 Exhibit Ex. 17)(Inz, Richard)
April 5, 2007 Filing 141 FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss (Memorandum In Support of Motion To Dismiss D.I. 140). Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc..(Inz, Richard) Modified on 3/20/2008 (KA).
April 5, 2007 Filing 140 MOTION to Dismiss All Patent-Related Claims And Counterclaims For Lack Of Case Or Controversy. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Inz, Richard)
April 4, 2007 Filing 139 MOTION for Leave to File Purdue's Supplemental Brief on its motion to Dismiss Rite Aid and Safeway's Complaints without Prejudice. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Brief#2 Attachment to Proposed Supplemental Brief#3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 1:06-cv-15326-SHS(Inz, Richard)
April 2, 2007 Filing 138 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #122 Brief,. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company. (Inz, Richard)
March 29, 2007 Filing 137 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (5 in 1:06-cv-15326-SHS) MOTION to Dismiss Rite Aid and Safeway's Complaints without Prejudice., (14 in 1:06-cv-15304-SHS) MOTION to Dismiss Rite Aid and Safeway's Complaints without Prejudice.. Document filed by Purdue Pharma, L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Euroceltique S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 1:06-cv-15326-SHS(Inz, Richard)
March 29, 2007 Filing 136 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Morris Buchman on behalf of Winthrop University Hospital (Buchman, Michael)
March 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Douglas Plymale to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #56 Motion for Art Sadin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/28/07) (rjm)
March 26, 2007 Filing 134 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to rule 41(a)(1)(i)... that Plaintiff The Harvard Drug Group, LLC ("Plaintiff") hereby voluntarily dismisses its complaint against Defendants Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, and PF Laboratories, Inc. ("Defendants"). The Defendants in this action have not filed an answer to Plaintiff's complaint or a motion for summary judgment, and Plaintiff has not previously dismissed an action based on or including the claim brought in this action in any court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). This dismissal is without prejudice. This Document relates to 07-1939. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/23/07) (rjm)
March 22, 2007 Filing 132 DECLARATION of Quyen Ta in Support re: #131 Opposition Brief,. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8)(Ta, Quyen)
March 22, 2007 Filing 131 OPPOSITION BRIEF of Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Impax Laboratories, Inc. to Supplement the Trial Record or, in the Alternative, Impax's Renewed Request to Make a Factual Record. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc..(Ta, Quyen)
March 22, 2007 Filing 130 DECLARATION of Paula L. Blizzard in Support re: #129 Reply. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4)(Blizzard, Paula)
March 22, 2007 Filing 129 REPLY of Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Impax Laboratories, Inc. in Support of Finding of Unenforceability Based on Inequitable Conduct. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Blizzard, Paula)
March 22, 2007 Filing 128 RESPONSE , Purdue's Opposition to Rite Aid and Safeway's Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c). Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company. (Attachments: #1 TAB A)(Inz, Richard)
March 22, 2007 Filing 127 BRIEF re: (170 in 1:99-cv-03658-SHS, 103 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Brief, (121 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Memorandum of Law in Opposition, (122 in 1:04-md-01603-SHS) Brief, Reply Brief of Boehringer Ingelheim In Support Of Its Contention That Purdue's U.S. Patent Nos. 5,549,912, 5,508,042, And 5,656,295 Are Unenforceable As A Result Of Inequitable Conduct. Document filed by Boehringer Ingelheim, GmbH, Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Coporation.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Sweeney, John)
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS... that the time for Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., and Euroceltique S.A. to file a brief in reply to Plaintiffs Rite Aid Corporation and Safeway Inc.'s opposition to Defts' 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints without prejudice in the entitled actions is extended to 3/29/07. Replies due by 3/29/2007. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 1:06-cv-15326-SHS(rjm)
March 16, 2007 Filing 125 STIPULATION... that Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, and P.F. Laboratories, Inc., who have waived service in the captioned action purs. to FRCP 4, will not be required to file any answer to Plaintiffs Complaint other than an answer to an amended consolidated complaint filed by the appropriate plaintiff class in 04MD1603. This Document relates to 07-1939. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/15/07) (rjm)
March 12, 2007 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Richard A. Inz in Support re: #122 Brief,. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E#2 Remand Exhibit 1 - 3#3 Remand Exhibit 4#4 Remand Exhibit 5 - 6#5 Remand Exhibit 7#6 Remand Exhibit 8)(Inz, Richard)
March 12, 2007 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #122 Brief, Purdue's motion to Supplement the Record. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P.. (Inz, Richard)
March 12, 2007 Filing 122 BRIEF , Purdue's Motion to Supplement the Record on the Enforceability of its Patents. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Purdue's Motion to Supplement the Record on the Enforceability of its Patents)(Inz, Richard)
March 12, 2007 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #103 Brief, #112 Brief on the Enforceability of the Patents in Suit. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P.. (Inz, Richard)
March 9, 2007 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Linda P. Nussbaum on behalf of Meijer, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00494-SHS(Nussbaum, Linda)
March 9, 2007 Filing 119 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Nadeem Faruqi on behalf of Pamela Krause. New Address: FARUQI & FARUQI, LLP, 369 Lexington Avenue, 10th Floor, New York, NY, 10017-6531, (212) 983-9330. (Faruqi, Nadeem)
March 9, 2007 Filing 118 NOTICE of of Firm Name Change and Phone and Facsimile Numbers. Document filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Neidoff, Allison)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATED ORDER STAYING PURDUE'S RESPONSE TO ROXANE'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM... It is hereby stipulated and agreed that attorneys for the parties, including Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Euroceltique, S.A., that the time for Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendaqnts Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. and The Purdue Pharma Company and Counterclaim Defendants Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Euroceltique, S.A. to respond to Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims is hereby stayed until further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/26/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:99-cv-03658-SHS(rjm)
March 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 06cv15304, 06cv15326); the time for plaintiffs Rite Aid Corporation and Safeway Inc. to file a brief in opposition to Purdue's 12(b)(1) motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint is extended to 3/12/2007. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/5/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:06-cv-15304-SHS, 1:06-cv-15326-SHS(kkc)
March 1, 2007 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert N. Kaplan on behalf of Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS(Kaplan, Robert)
February 22, 2007 Filing 114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Corrected Brief of Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Impax Laboratories, Inc. in Support of Finding of Unenforceability Based on Inequitable Conduct & Supplemental Declaration of Quyen Ta In Support of Corrected Brief served on Herbert Schwart on February 22, 2007. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Bhansali, Asim)
February 22, 2007 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Quyen Ta in Support re: #112 Brief. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2, Part 1#3 Exhibit 2, Part 2)(Ta, Quyen)
February 22, 2007 Filing 112 AMENDED BRIEF re: #104 Brief in support of Finding of Unenforceability Based on Inequitable Conduct. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc..(Bhansali, Asim)
February 21, 2007 Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Brief of Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Impax Laboratories, Inc. In Support of Finding of Unenforceability Based on Inequitable Conduct; Declaration of Quyen Ta In Support of Brief; Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Brief; Declaration of Paula Blizzard in Support of Request for Judicial Notice served on Herbert Schwart on February 20, 2007. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Bhansali, Asim)
February 21, 2007 Filing 110 DECLARATION of Paula L. Blizzard in Support re: #109 Brief. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Blizzard, Paula)
February 21, 2007 Filing 109 BRIEF re: #104 Brief Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Impax Brief for Finding of Unenforceability Based on Inequitable Conduct. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc..(Blizzard, Paula)
February 21, 2007 Filing 108 DECLARATION of Quyen Ta in Support re: #104 Brief. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 49, Part 1#2 Exhibit 49, Part 2#3 Exhibit 50#4 Exhibit 51#5 Exhibit 52#6 Exhibit 53#7 Exhibit 54#8 Exhibit 55#9 Exhibit 56#10 Exhibit 57#11 Exhibit 58)(Ta, Quyen)
February 20, 2007 Filing 107 DECLARATION of Quyen Ta in Support re: #104 Brief. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36#2 Exhibit 37#3 Exhibit 38#4 Exhibit 39, Part 1#5 Exhibit 39, Part 2#6 Exhibit 40#7 Exhibit 41, Part 1#8 Exhibit 41, part 2#9 Exhibit 42#10 Exhibit 43#11 Exhibit 44#12 Exhibit 45#13 Exhibit 46#14 Exhibit 47#15 Exhibit 48)(Ta, Quyen)
February 20, 2007 Filing 106 DECLARATION of Quyen Ta in Support re: #104 Brief. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29, Part 1#2 Exhibit 29, Part 2#3 Exhibit 30#4 Exhibit 31#5 Exhibit 32#6 Exhibit 33#7 Exhibit 34#8 Exhibit 35, Part 1#9 Exhibit 35, Part 2)(Ta, Quyen)
February 20, 2007 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Quyen Ta in Support re: #104 Brief. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2, Part 1#3 Exhibit 2, Part 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8#10 Exhibit 9#11 Exhibit 10#12 Exhibit 11#13 Exhibit 12#14 Exhibit 13#15 Exhibit 14#16 Exhibit 15#17 Exhibit 16#18 Exhibit 17#19 Exhibit 18#20 Exhibit 19#21 Exhibit 20#22 Exhibit 21#23 Exhibit 22#24 Exhibit 23#25 Exhibit 24#26 Exhibit 25#27 Exhibit 26#28 Exhibit 27#29 Exhibit 28)(Ta, Quyen)
February 20, 2007 Filing 104 BRIEF In Support of Finding of Unenforceability Based on Inequitable Conduct. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc..(Bhansali, Asim)
February 16, 2007 Filing 103 BRIEF Of Boehringer Ingelheim In Support Of Its Contention That Purdue's U.S. Patent Nos. 5,549,912, 5,508,042 And 5,656,295 Are Unenforceable As A Result Of Inequitable Conduct. Document filed by Boehringer Ingelheim, GmbH, Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Coporation.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Sweeney, John)
February 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Joseph C. Gratz for Impax Laboratories, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/7/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS, 1:02-cv-07569-SHS, 1:02-cv-08036-SHS(rjm)
February 6, 2007 Filing 101 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Richard Wolfe Cohen on behalf of Aetna, Inc., Humana, Inc.. New Address: Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad Selinger & Cohen, P.C., White Plains Plaza, 1 North Broadway - 5th Floor, White Plains, New York, USA 10601, 914-997-0500. (Cohen, Richard)
January 26, 2007 Filing 100 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Richard Alan Inz on behalf of Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., The Purdue Pharama Company. New Address: Ropes & Gray LLP, 1211 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, USA 10036, 212-596-9000. (Inz, Richard)
January 22, 2007 Filing 99 BRIEF re: #98 Opposition Brief Declaration of Richard A. Inz. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit 9#10 Exhibit 10#11 Exhibit 11#12 Exhibit 12#13 Exhibit 13#14 Exhibit 14#15 Exhibit 15#16 Exhibit 16#17 Exhibit 17#18 Exhibit 18)(Inz, Richard)
January 22, 2007 Filing 98 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #93 Brief to Make a Factual Record. Document filed by Purdue Phama L.P..(Inz, Richard)
January 11, 2007 Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 04md1603 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (aba, )
January 9, 2007 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Declaration of Paula L. Blizzard in Support of Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Brief on its Right to Make a Factual Record served on All Listed Parties on 01/08/2007. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Blizzard, Paula)
January 9, 2007 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Impax's Brief on its Right to Make a Factual Record served on All Listed Parties on 01/08/2007. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Bhansali, Asim)
January 8, 2007 Filing 94 BRIEF re: #93 Brief Declaration of Paula L. Blizzard in Support of Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Brief On Its Right To Make a Factual Record. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6)(Blizzard, Paula)
January 8, 2007 Filing 93 BRIEF ON ITS RIGHT TO MAKE A FACTUAL RECORD. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc..(Bhansali, Asim)
January 5, 2007 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #86 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 1/5/07, Receipt Number 601610. (rjm, )
December 19, 2006 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Jason Pashman on behalf of Impax Laboratories, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc. (Pashman, Scott)
December 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2006 09:30 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein... and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(rjm, )
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Quyen L. Ta for IMPAX Laboratories, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/4/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS(rjm, )
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Brook Dooley for IMPAX Laboratories, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/4/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS(rjm, )
November 15, 2006 Filing 88 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas. Document filed by IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3)(Bhansali, Asim)
October 31, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [87 in 04md1603] Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/31/06, Receipt Number 595513. (rjm, )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Paula L. Blizzard for Impax Laboratories, Inc. and IMPAX Laboratories, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/23/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS(rjm, )
October 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Daralyn J. Durie for Impax Laboratories, Inc. and IMPAX Laboratories, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/20/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS(rjm, )
September 26, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #84 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,, #85 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,, #83 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,, #82 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,,,,, in the amount of $100.00, paid on 9/26/06, Receipt Number 591771. (rjm, )
September 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney M. King Hill, III for Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/19/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(rjm, )
September 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney William Coston for Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/19/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(rjm, )
September 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Mark D. Maneche for Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/19/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(rjm, )
September 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Paul F Strain for Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/19/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(rjm, )
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Jo Illingworth terminated . (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/6/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(rjm, )
September 5, 2006 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David T. Fischer on behalf of Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Fischer, David)
September 5, 2006 Filing 79 MOTION for Jennifer J. Illingworth to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Fischer, David)
July 27, 2006 Filing 78 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL that the law firm of Kenyon & Kenyon LLP and its undersigned attorneys hereby provide notice that, at the request of Deft. and Counterclaim-Ptff. Impax Laboratories, Inc., they have withdrawn as counsel for Impax in the captioned actions. Impax will continue to be represented in this action by the following current counsel of record: Asim M. Bhansali KEKER & VAN NEST LLP 710 Sansome Street San Francisco, CA 94111 (415) 391-5400. Document filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc. This Document relates to 02-2803, 02-7569, 02-8036. (rjm, )
June 9, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #58 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, #33 Order, in the amount of $100.00, paid on 6/9/06, Receipt Number 581280. (rjm, )
May 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ON ATTACHED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE of Bonny E. Sweeney, Christopher M. Burke, Edmund W. Searby, and Walter W. Noss to practice pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Medic Drug Inc. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/22/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS(rjm, )
May 18, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #59 Order, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 5/18/06, Receipt Number 579677. (rjm, )
March 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ORDER NO. 2: It is hereby ordered that all motions to stay the actions coordinated under 04MD1603, made by Perdue prior to the Initial Conference are denied. Purdue's Motion for Stay dated 2/9/06: As a result of the Federal Circuit's decision, Purdue has again moved to stay all activity in this multidistrict litigation pending the Court's determination of the patent claims in Endo on remand from the Federal Circuit. The Court has reviewed Purdue's submissions, as well as the numerous submissions filed in opposition to Purdue's motion, and hereby grants Purdue's Motion for Stay dated 2/9/06... Direct Purchasers Interim Class Counsel Motion... Motion for entry of Case Management Order No. 1 Applicable to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs is granted only insofar as it seeks consolidation of all direct purchaser actions and appointment of Garwin, Gerstein & Fisher LLP, Berger & Montague, PC and Boiles, Schiller & Flexner LLP as direct purchaser interim co-lead class counsel. The motion is denied in all other respects. Indirect Purchasers Interim Class Counsel Motion... Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel for End-Payor Ptffs. and for Consolidation is granted. All end-payor class actions are hereby consolidated, and Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLLP, Hagens Berman Shapiro LLP, Miller Faucher & Cafferty, LLP, and Labaton Sucharow & Rudoff LLP are appointed indirect purchaser interim co-lead class counsel. Winthrop-University Hospital v. Purdue Pharma L.P., etal., No. 04cv0957. Winthrop shall be a separate case in the MDL. Winthrop's Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel dtd 12/23/05 is denied. Balloveras v. The Purdue Pharma Co., etal. No. 04cv4039. Balloveras's Motion for an order appointing the Firm of Harke & Clasby LLP as Interim Class Counsel dated 8/11/04 is denied. Consolidated Amended Complaints. Direct Purchaser Class Counsel & Indirect Purchaser Class Counsel shall each file a Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint covering their consolidated actions within 60 days after the stay imposed by this Order is lifted... Purdue Defts' Motion to Dismiss. Within 30 days after the filing of the consolidated amended complaints and counterclaims, the Purdue defts. shall file their response. If such response is a motion to dismiss, Purdue shall file a memorandum of law in support of no more than 50 pages... Remand Motions. All pending motions to remand in any of the consolidated actions are hereby dismissed without prejudice... and as further specified in this section regarding Consolidated Briefing & Case-Specific Remand Issues. Abbott Laboratories' Motions to Dismiss... The Court hereby dismisses without prejudiceAbbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss in: 04-4039, *05-3827, 04-5256, 04-7080, 04-5450, 04-7119, 04-7115, 05-3500, *04-3499. The Court also dismisses without prejudice Abbott Laboratories' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss filed dated 7/7/05 as to 04-0196, 04-2078, 04-0315, 04-0651, 04-1212, 04-1808, 04-2089, 04-2179, and 04-3093. Abbott should refile its motions, if appropriate when the stay imposed by this Order is lifted. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/30/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS,1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-01212-SHS, 1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS,1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS. This Document also relates to 05cv3827, 04cv3499.(rjm, ) Modified on 3/30/2006 (rjm, ).
March 29, 2006 Filing 75 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David Brian Wechsler on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Health Benefits Fund. New Address: Wechsler & Cohen, LLP, 17 State Street, 15th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10004, (212) 847-7900. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Wechsler, David)
February 27, 2006 Filing 74 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #63 MOTION to Stay. and to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Opposition. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, PF Lab Inc., Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., PRA Holdings, Inc., The Purdue Pharama Company, Purdue Pharma, Ltd., Purdue Pharma, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
February 24, 2006 Filing 73 OPPOSITION BRIEF Plaintiffs' Opposition to Abbott Laboratories' and Abbott Laboratories Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss.. Document filed by Williams.(Siegel, Eric)
February 23, 2006 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #63 MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Kovel, David)
February 23, 2006 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David E Kovel on behalf of City of New York (Kovel, David)
February 21, 2006 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #63 MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by Neighborcare, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Stein, Jerald)
February 21, 2006 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #63 MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Drubel, Richard)
February 21, 2006 Filing 68 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (WRONG PARTY SELECTED) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #63 MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Drubel, Richard) Modified on 2/21/2006 (gf, ).
February 17, 2006 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion re: #63 MOTION to Stay. Response to Motion for Stay Submitted by Impax Laboratories, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Document filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Jean, Patrice)
February 16, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #53 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,,,,,, in the amount of $75.00, paid on 2/16/06, Receipt Number 570300. (rjm, )
February 16, 2006 Filing 66 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #63 MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, PF Lab Inc., Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., PRA Holdings, Inc., The Purdue Pharama Company, Purdue Pharma, Ltd., Purdue Pharma, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
February 14, 2006 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re: #63 MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C Building Trades Welfare Plan, IBEW-NECA Local 505 Health & Welfare Plan, Mechanical Contractors-UA Local 119 Welfare Plan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Eisler, Robert)
February 10, 2006 Filing 64 RESPONSE to Motion re: #63 MOTION to Stay. Certain Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Stay. Document filed by Walgreen Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Perwin, Scott)
February 9, 2006 Filing 63 MOTION to Stay. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, PF Lab Inc., Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., The Purdue Pharama Company, Purdue Pharma, Ltd., Purdue Pharma, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Purdue's Motion to Stay#2 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Hester, Timothy)
February 2, 2006 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/18/06, 10:30am. before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (rjm, )
February 1, 2006 Filing 61 NOTICE of Federal Circuit Decision. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, PF Lab Inc., Purdue Phama L.P., Purdue Pharma L.P., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Euroceltique S.A., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, The Purdue Pharma Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., PRA Holdings, Inc., The Purdue Pharama Company, Purdue Pharma, Ltd., Purdue Pharma, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma Company. (Attachments: #1)(Lynch, Mark)
January 30, 2006 Filing 60 MOTION to Approve Plaintiffs' and Competitor Counterclaimants' Proposed Order No. 2 Concerning Initial Case Management Conference Rulings. Document filed by Health Care for All. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Nalven, David)
January 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that Ben Barnow is admitted to practice pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ashley Kooman. An attorney admitted pro hac vice is required to pay a $25.00 attorney admission fee and present this order to the intake deputy clerk in the Clerk's Office. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/26/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS(rjm, )
January 23, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #28 Order, in the amount of $75.00, paid on 1/23/06, Receipt Number 567011. Relates to 04-9813. (rjm, )
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Charles Ferrier Zimmer, II for Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., John Alden Meade for Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Stuart Des Roches for Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/23/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS.(lan, )
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 Motion for James R. Dugan, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . James R. Dugan, II is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. An attorney admitted to practice pro hac vice is required to pay a fee of $25.00 attorney admission fee. This Order confirms your appearance as counsel in this case and it will be entered on the Court's docket... (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/23/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, )
January 20, 2006 Filing 56 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Art Sadin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Supporting Affidavits of David S. Nalven and Art Sadin attached. Document filed by Health Care for All, Carol Puerling, Connecticut Citizen Action Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (rjm, ).
January 20, 2006 Filing 55 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Douglas R. Plymale to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Supporting Affidavits of David S. Nalven and Douglas R. Plymale attached. Document filed by Health Care for All, Carol Puerling, Connecticut Citizen Action Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (rjm, ).
January 20, 2006 Filing 54 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for James R. Dugan, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Supporting Affidavit of David S. Nalven and James R. Dugan,II attached. Document filed by Health Care for All, Carol Puerling, Connecticut Citizen Action Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (rjm, ).
January 18, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #29 Order, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 1/18/2006, Receipt Number E566639. (lan, )
January 18, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #35 Order, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 1/18/2006, Receipt Number E566636. (lan, )
January 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Neil L. Henrichsen, Heather M. Collins and Shands M. Wulbern to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel on behalf of plaintiffs Chaballa (05cv3500(SHS)), Williams (04cv7080(SHS)) and Weaver/Presley (04cv7115(SHS)). An attorney admitted to practice pro hac vice is required to pay $25.00 attorney admission fee and present this Order to the Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/18/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, )
January 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Bryan L. Clobes for Neighborcare, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice until the conclusion of this case. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand (Part I) on 1/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:04-cv-03156-SHS.(lan, )
January 17, 2006 Filing 51 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Appointment of James R. Dugan II as End-Payor Marketing and Sales Practice Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by James R. Dugan, II. ( Received in Night Deposit Box on 1/17/2006 at 6:13pm) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, ) Modified on 1/23/2006 (lan, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (rjm, ).
January 17, 2006 Filing 50 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for William Coston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Supporting Affirmation of Allison B. Neidoff and Affidavit of William Coston attached. Document filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Return Date set for 1/18/2006 at 9:30 AM. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (rjm, ).
January 12, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #36 Order, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 1/12/2006, Receipt Number E566243. (lan, )
January 11, 2006 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #21 MOTION to Appoint Counsel on an Interim Basis for a Proposed Class of Hospitals and Healthcare Delivery Organizations that Purchased Directly through Group Purchasing Organizations.. Document filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., SAJ Distributors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Cebulash, Brett)
January 11, 2006 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Neil L. Henrichsen, Heather M. Collins, and Shands M. Wulbern. Document filed by Chaballa, Weaver/ Presley, Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Affidavit of Eric L. Siegel#3 Service List#4 Declaration of Neil L. Henrichsen#5 Certificate of Good Standing for NLH#6 Declaration of Heather M. Collins#7 Certificate of Good Standing for HMC#8 Declaration of Shands M. Wulbern#9 Certificate of Good Standing for SMW)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(Siegel, Eric)
January 10, 2006 Filing 49 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ann D. White on behalf of Gary Jaffe. New Address: Ann D. White Law Offices, P.C., One Pitcairn Place, Suite 2400, 165 Township Line Road, Jenkintown, PA, 10946. (lan, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (rjm, ).
January 10, 2006 Filing 37 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David Boies, II on behalf of Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.. New Address: Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP, 333 Main Street, Armonk, New York, U.S.A. 10504, 914-749-8200. (Boies, David)
January 9, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #34 Order, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 1/9/2006, Receipt Number E565822. (lan, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 48 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Mark D. Maneche to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Supporting Affirmation of Allison B. Neidoff and Affidavit of Mark D. Maneche attached. Document filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Return Date set for 1/18/2006 at 9:30 AM. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (rjm, ).
January 9, 2006 Filing 47 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for M. King Hill, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Supporting Affirmation of Allison B. Neidoff and Affidavit of M. King Hill, III attached. Document filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Return Date set for 1/18/2006 at 9:30 AM. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (rjm, ).
January 9, 2006 Filing 46 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Paul Strain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Supporting Affirmation of Allison B. Neidoff and Affidavit of Paul Strain attached. Document filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Return Date set for 1/18/2006 at 9:30 AM. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, ) . Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (rjm, ).
January 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR ADMISSION OF THOMAS M. SOBOL TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE that Thomas M. Sobol is granted permission to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. An attorney admitted to practice pro hac vice is required to pay a fee of $25.00 attorney admission fee and present this order to the intake deputy clerk in the Clerk's Office... and as further set forth in said order. This Document relates to All End-Payor Cases. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/6/06) (rjm, )
January 5, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #30 Order in the amount of $50.00, paid on 1/5/2006, Receipt Number E565695. (lan, )
January 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE that the Court grants the application to appear pro hac vice and orders that N. Nathan Neuman be allowed to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Neighborcare, Inc. until the conclusion of this case. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/5/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:04-cv-03156-SHS(rjm, )
January 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE that Neil K. Roman be hereby admitted pro hac vice in connection with this action on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., and Euroceltique, S.A. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/5/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS(rjm, )
January 4, 2006 Filing 45 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Neil K. Roman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Supporting Declarations of Michael C. Nicholson and Neil K. Roman attached. Document filed by Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Euroceltique S.A., Purdue Pharma. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03295-SHS,1:04-cv-03499-SHS,1:04-cv-03719-SHS,1:04-cv-03890-SHS, 1:04-cv-04039-SHS,1:04-cv-04574-SHS,1:04-cv-04575-SHS,1:04-cv-04892-SHS,1:04-cv-04893-SHS, 1:04-cv-04894-SHS,1:04-cv-04895-SHS,1:04-cv-04960-SHS,1:04-cv-04961-SHS,1:04-cv-04962-SHS, 1:04-cv-05253-SHS,1:04-cv-05256-SHS,1:04-cv-05450-SHS,1:04-cv-07080-SHS,1:04-cv-07115-SHS, 1:04-cv-07116-SHS,1:04-cv-07117-SHS,1:04-cv-07118-SHS,1:04-cv-07119-SHS,1:04-cv-07120-SHS, 1:04-cv-07621-SHS,1:04-cv-08552-SHS,1:04-cv-08553-SHS,1:04-cv-09649-SHS,1:04-cv-09813-SHS, 1:05-cv-03285-SHS,1:05-cv-03500-SHS,1:05-cv-04761-SHS,1:05-cv-08528-SHS,1:99-cv-03658-SHS.(lan, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (rjm, ).
January 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE ORDER that the motion for admission pro hac vice of David P. Smith (listed as Doc. No. 25 in Case No. 04-02290) is granted... A notation of your admission pro hac vice for the above listed case will be made on the roll of attorneys. The attorney admitted pro hac vice must serve a copy of this Order on all other counsel in this case. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/4/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS(rjm, )
January 3, 2006 Filing 44 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Kevin B. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Supporting Declaration of Hollis L. Salzman and supporting Affidavit of Kevin B. Love attached. Document filed by Vista Healthplan, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-md-01603-SHS,1:01-cv-02109-SHS,1:01-cv-08177-SHS,1:01-cv-08507-SHS,1:01-cv-11212-SHS, 1:02-cv-02803-SHS,1:02-cv-07569-SHS,1:02-cv-08036-SHS,1:03-cv-02312-SHS,1:04-cv-00112-SHS, 1:04-cv-00154-SHS,1:04-cv-00196-SHS,1:04-cv-00229-SHS,1:04-cv-00314-SHS,1:04-cv-00315-SHS, 1:04-cv-00327-SHS,1:04-cv-00487-SHS,1:04-cv-00494-SHS,1:04-cv-00607-SHS,1:04-cv-00637-SHS, 1:04-cv-00651-SHS,1:04-cv-00929-SHS,1:04-cv-00957-SHS,1:04-cv-01014-SHS,1:04-cv-01083-SHS, 1:04-cv-01212-SHS,1:04-cv-01354-SHS,1:04-cv-01446-SHS,1:04-cv-01808-SHS,1:04-cv-02078-SHS, 1:04-cv-02089-SHS,1:04-cv-02179-SHS,1:04-cv-02297-SHS,1:04-cv-02298-SHS,1:04-cv-02378-SHS, 1:04-cv-02604-SHS,1:04-cv-02749-SHS,1:04-cv-03093-SHS,1:04-cv-03131-SHS,1:04-cv-03132-SHS, 1:04-cv-03156-SHS,1:04-cv-03