Cook et al v. The City of New York, Administration for Children's Services et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv04371
Filed: May 4, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Deborah A. Batts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: In accordance with the Court's Emergency Rules related to the COVID-19 pandemic, the status conference scheduled for 3/26/2020 at 3:00 p.m. will be held via conference call. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules r elated to the COVID-19 pandemic, which are available on the Court's website, for dial-in numbers for the conference and other relevant information. Ms. Louzoun is directed to serve a copy of this order on Shamekia Cook, and to file proof of such service. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/23/2020) (tro)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: The Court will hold a conference in this case on March 26, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. The Court is in receipt of Trustee Malka Louzon's letter dated March 9, 2020. The parties are directed to address all further correspondence to the Court, file all correspondence on ECF, and to comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. The Court notes that Ms. Louzoun's letter refers to a conversation between Ms. Louzoun and court staff; no ex parte communication occurr ed, as Ms. Louzoun was directed by phone to submit a letter to the Court. Ms. Louzoun is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Shamekia Cook, and to retain proof of such service. SOORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/13/2020) (ama)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: This case was reassigned to the undersigned on February 26, 2020. On October 17, 2019, Judge Batts reopened this case and ordered the parties to provide a status report by December 20, 2020 "as to the status and what you need the Court to help with." October 17, 2019 Hearing Tr. at 23:2524:1, Dkt. No. 39. The Court has not received any update from the parties. Therefore, this case will once again be closed. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal the transcript of the October 1 7, 2019 hearing, Dkt. No. 39, and to close this case. Trustee Malka Louzoun is directed to serve a copy of this order on Shamekia Cook, and to retain proof of such service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/04/2020) (ama) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESETTLED ORDER OF COMPROMISE: It is hereby ordered that supplemental needs irrevocable trusts, as shall be approved by this Court, shall be established for the benefit of TARJARAE MCNAIR, QUANISHA MCNAIR and JASMINE OWENS for the placement of the ne t proceeds of this action, as set forth herein. The sums used to establish the accounts for each minor child shall be held until each child's 18th birthday or earlier release by application to the Court. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 8/26/2009) (jpo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook et al v. The City of New York, Administration for Children's Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?