Norkin v. DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary L.L.P. Featured Case

Plaintiff David Norkin alleged that Defendant DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary, LLP committed professional malpractice and breached its fiduciary duty to him and Britestarr by operating under an undisclosed conflict of interest when it (1) provided him with advice in connection with his personal bankruptcy proceeding, and (2) recommended that Britestarr file for bankruptcy and that Norkin resign as its president.

Plaintiff: David Norkin
Defendant: DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary L.L.P.
Case Number: 1:2005cv09137
Filed: October 26, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Westchester
Presiding Judge: Denise L. Cote
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29
OPINION AND ORDER:92936 For the foregoing reasons, plaintiff's motion to remand is denied; defendant's motion to transfer is granted; and defendant's motion to dismiss or alternatively, for summary judgment, is transferred to the District of Connecticut. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/31/2006) (lb, ) Modified on 4/3/2006 (ew, ).
February 6, 2006 Filing 26
STIPULATION: plaintiff's time to respond to defendants motion to transfer is extended to 2/10/06. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/6/06) (db, )
February 3, 2006 Filing 25
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 7 MOTION to Remand Case to Supreme Court, NY County.. Document filed by David Norkin. (Asche, Richard)
January 19, 2006 Filing 23
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Transfer Case To Connecticut.. Document filed by DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary L.L.P.. (Koh, Howard)
January 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18
STIPULATION AND ORDER; defendant will file its response to plaintiff's motion to remandand defendant's reply in connection with its motion to dismiss on or before 1/19/06; the plaintiff will file his reply with respect to the motion to remand on or before 2/3/06. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/9/06) (sac, )
January 5, 2006 Filing 17
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: granting 10 MOTION for James P. Ulwick, Esq., Kevin F. Arthur, Esq. and Jean E. Lewis, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary L.L.P., (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/5/06) (pl, )
December 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 13
ORDER: plaintiff's 12/7/05 petter application for a deferred briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss is DENIED. The schedule set forth in the 11/28/05 stipulation remains in place. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/9/05) (db, )
November 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 12
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/16/2005 11:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/29/05) (pl, )
November 29, 2005 Filing 11
STIPULATION that plntf will file his motion to remand this action to state court on or before 11/23/05; plntf will respond to deft's motion to dismiss the action on or before 12/23/05; deft willfile response to plntf's motiont o remand and deft's reply on or before 1/13/06; plntf will file his reply re motion to remand on or before 1/27/06. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/28/05) (cd, )
November 7, 2005 Filing 6
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary L.L.P.. (Koh, Howard)
October 26, 2005 Filing 2
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary L.L.P..(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2005 (lb, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norkin v. DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Norkin
Represented By: Richard Milton Asche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary L.L.P.
Represented By: James P. Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?