Laurent v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv02280
Filed: March 23, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: George B. Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER: In light of the Supreme Court's denial of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's petition for certiorari, the stay in this case is hereby lifted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/29/2021) (js)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER. In light of the possible Supreme Court review of the Second Circuit's decision in Laurent v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, 945 F.3d 739, 749 (2d Cir. 2019), the Court hereby stays this action pending the outcome of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's petition for certiorari. The parties are directed to file a joint status letter informing the Court when a decision regarding the pending cert petition has been made. The Clerk of Court is directed to stay the case pending further order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/10/21) (yv)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 OPINION AND ORDER re: 246 MOTION For Clarification and/or Modification filed by Smeeta Sharon, Timothy D. Laurent. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for clarification or modification is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 246. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/24/2018) (mro)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 240) is DENIED. As counsel for Plaintiffs acknowledged during oral argument, the conclusion reached by the Court resolves all remaining claims asserted in this action. Accordingly, the Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/19/2018) (ama)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 OPINION AND ORDER re: 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Smeeta Sharon, Timothy D. Laurent, 209 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings dismissing the Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint with prejudice filed by The Adminstrative Committee to the Retirement Benefit Accumulation Plan for Employees of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, The Retirement Benefit Accumulation Plan for Employees of PricewaterhouseCo opers LLP, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 209 and 216. The parties are directed to provide a status update or proposed judgment to the Court by August 14, 2017. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/24/2017) (cf)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 OPINION AND ORDER re: 161 MOTION to Certify Class. MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Smeeta Sharon, Timothy D. Laurent: For the foreg oing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion to certify a class of those PWC employees who elected to take lump-sum distribution of their benefits under PWC's Retirement Benefit Accumulation Plan between March 23, 2000, and August 17, 2006, is certified. Mr. Gottesdiener is appointed class counsel. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to close the motion pending at Docket Number 161. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/26/2014) (tn)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 154 MOTION for Certification, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b), of the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. MOTION for Certification, Pursuant to 28 U.S .C. § 1292(b), of the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by The Adminstrative Committee to the Retirement Benefit Accumulation Plan for Employees of PricewaterhouseCooper s LLP, The Retirement Benefit Accumulation Plan for Employees of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. For the foregoing reasons, this Court's Aug. 8, 2013 Order, denying PwC's motion to dismiss with respect to counts one, five, and six of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, is hereby certified for interlocutory review. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the motion at docket number 154. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/22/2014) (ama)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 137 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by The Administrative Committee to the Retirement Benefit Accumulation Plan for Employees of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, The Retirement Benefit Accumula tion Plan for Employees of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motion to dismiss is DENIED.The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion entry at Dkt. No. 137.SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/08/2013) (ama)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: Plaintiffs moved, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56(f), for an order refusing defendants' application for summary judgment on the grounds that plaintiffs lack the discovery necessary to oppose the motion. Accordingly, plaintiffs' motion, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56(f), is denied. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/27/2009) (jpo) Modified on 4/17/2009 (jpo).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laurent v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?