Person v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Carl E. Person contends that defendant Google, Inc.'s quality score analysis prevents him from purchasing keyword targeted internet advertising at the advertised minimum cost-per-click prices and discriminates against him and other small business users who are not high volume advertisers.

Plaintiff: Carl E. Person
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2006cv04683
Filed: June 19, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Robert P. Patterson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2006. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2006 Received a letter from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of the entire file and assigned Case Number: C-06-7297(JCS). (tve)
November 2, 2006 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 09/13/06 before Judge Robert P. Patterson. (es, )
October 17, 2006 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/13/2006 before Judge Robert P. Patterson. (aba, )
October 17, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 26 Memo Endorsement, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/11/2006, Receipt Number 593158. (jd, )
October 11, 2006 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Northern District of California at San Jose. Sent certified copy of docket entries and transfer order in ECF Case. Mailed via Federal Express AIRBILL #8575 0916 4131 on 11/22/06. (djc, )
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION and ORDER re: granting 7 MOTION to Dismiss for improper venue...; Thus the dispute is hereby transferred to the Northeren District of California at San Jose, which is in Santa Clara County, the forum selected by the contract. filed by Google, Inc.,. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 10/11/06) (djc, )
October 10, 2006 Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 24 MOTION for David H. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Google Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Motion GRANTED. David H. Kramer is admitted pro hac vice upon his paying the required fee to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 10/9/06) (js, )
October 10, 2006 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carl E. Person on behalf of Carl E. Person (Person, Carl)
October 10, 2006 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 26 Memo Endorsement, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js, )
September 29, 2006 Filing 24 MOTION for David H. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc. Proposed Order attached. (db, )
September 29, 2006 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Sara Beth Ciarelli to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. 23 Motion to admit Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. (kg)
September 28, 2006 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David H. Kramer. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Sara B. Ciarelli Declaration In Support# 2 Exhibit A to Sara B. Ciarelli Declaration In Support# 3 Proposed Order# 4 Certificate of Service)(Ciarelli, Sara) Modified on 9/29/2006 (kg).
September 22, 2006 Filing 22 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard P. Pertterson from Jonathan M. Jacobson dated 9/18/2006 re: to the parties should await the Court 's decision on the original motion to dismiss before any other activity in the case is undertaken. The Court's analysis may resolve various issues Mr. Person may seek to raise in his Amended Complaint, including whether this action is properly venued here.ENDORSEMENT: Applcation granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 9/18/2006) (jmi, )
September 22, 2006 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Change of Address served on Carl E. Person on 9-21-06. Service was made by Overnight Mail. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Ciarelli, Sara)
September 21, 2006 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sara Beth Ciarelli on behalf of Google, Inc.. New Address: Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, Professional Corporation, 1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10019, (212) 999-5800. (Ciarelli, Sara)
September 21, 2006 Filing 19 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson from Carl E. Person dated 9/18/2006 re: requesting permission to file the first amended complaint at some point in the litigation, and that the Court grant leave to amend its decision based on the original complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Application Denied. In response to defendant's motion to dismiss, plaintiff filed a cross-motion amending his complaint on 8/3/2006 under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). This is a second amendment. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 9/20/2006) (lb, )
September 21, 2006 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 19 Endorsed Letter,,, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (lb, )
September 20, 2006 Filing 18 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson Jr. from Carl E. Person dated 9/15/2006 re: to after reviewing the transcript of the argument on September 13th, I have decided to amend my complaint (to cure weaknesses discussed at the argument), and expect to file the amended complaint on Monday or Tuesday. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff application to amend for the second time is denied since it was after argument of the motion to dismiss. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 9/18/2006) (jmi, )
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that this case should be designated as an ECF case. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 9/20/06) (dle, )
September 20, 2006 Case Designated ECF. (dle, )
September 13, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert P. Patterson : Oral Argument held on 9/13/2006 re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Google, Inc.,. (dle, )
September 8, 2006 Filing 16 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson from Sara Ciarelli dated 9/7/06 re: This letter confirms that oral argument on Google's Motion to Dismiss and plaintiff's Cross-Motion to transfer action to California is scheduled for Wednesday, September 13, 2006 at 11:00 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 9/6/06) (js, )
August 31, 2006 Filing 15 DECLARATION of David Dinucci in Support re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss purs to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 129B)(3) AND 12(B)(6) for improper venue and failure to state a clim upon which relief can be granted. Document filed by Google, Inc. (jar, )
August 31, 2006 Filing 14 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss purs to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 129B)(3) AND 12(B)(6) for improper venue and failure to state a clim upon which relief can be granted. Document filed by Google, Inc. (jar, )
August 22, 2006 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Google, Inc. served on 6/26/2006, answer due 7/17/2006. Service was accepted by Basel Clarke. Document filed by Carl E. Person. (pl, )
August 3, 2006 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Carl E. Person in Support re: 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Document filed by Carl E. Person. (jco, )
August 3, 2006 Filing 11 MOTION for an Order under Rule 15(a), F.R.C.P., granting leave for the plaintiff to amend his original complaint by addition of the following two paragraphs: as set forth in this Motion. Document filed by Carl E. Person. (jco, )
August 3, 2006 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Carl E. Person. (jco, )
July 27, 2006 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Sara Ciarelli in Support re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (djc, )
July 27, 2006 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (djc, )
July 27, 2006 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss purs to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 129B)(3) AND 12(B)(6) for improper venue and failure to state a clim upon which relief can be granted. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (djc, )
June 30, 2006 Filing 6 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Patterson from Jonathan Jacobson dated 6/29/06: Google's time to answer the complaint is extended until 7/27; Google's motion to dismiss shall be fld by 7/27, plntf's opposition shall be fld by 8/17, and Google's reply by 8/31/06 and briefing concerning plntf's preliminary injunction motion is suspended pending consideration of the motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 6/29/06) (cd, )
June 28, 2006 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Carl E. Person in Support re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Carl E. Person. (pl, )
June 28, 2006 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Carl E. Person. (pl, )
June 28, 2006 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction enjoining Google Inc. from offering any keyword - target Internet advertising in the U.S. or in N.Y.S at Pay-Per-Clik prices unless... Document filed by Carl E. Person. Return Date set for 7/3/2006 09:30 AM. (pl, )
June 27, 2006 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Carl E. Person. Return Date set for 7/3/2006 09:30 AM. (Person, Carl) Modified on 6/27/2006 (kg).
June 27, 2006 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Carl E. Person to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Document No. 2. This case is not ECF. (kg)
June 19, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 582533)Document filed by Carl E. Person.(jeh, )
June 19, 2006 Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (jeh, )
June 19, 2006 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google, Inc. (jeh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Person v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl E. Person
Represented By: Carl E. Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?