Zipporah Films, Inc. v. Madison Square Garden, L.P. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Zipporah Films, Inc. alleges that Defendants Madison Square Garden, L.P. and Madison Square Garden Center, Inc. unreasonably withheld approval of the documentary film entitled The Garden and that plaintiff is entitled to publicly exhibit and distribute it pursuant to the terms of the agreement between the parties.

Plaintiff: Zipporah Films, Inc.
Defendant: Madison Square Garden, L.P. and Madison Square Garden Center, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Madison Square Garden, L.P. and Madison Square Garden Center, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Zipporah Films, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2006cv06451
Filed: August 25, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Denny Chin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2007 Filing 23
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Steven J. Hyman dated 9/10/07 re: plaintiff respectfully. ENDORSEMENT: the trial is adjourned sine die. The parties are on 48-hour notice, but the Court will provide as much notice as possible. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/24/07) (pl) Modified on 9/24/2007 (Lancaster, Patricia).
June 28, 2007 Filing 22
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Deanna R. Waldron dated 6/27/07 re: parties jointly request an adjournment of the Final Pretrial Conference and an extension of the deadline to compete discovery;. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to 9/7/07, at 10:30 a.m. All discovery fact and expert is to be completed by then. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 6/28/07) (pl)
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21
REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plenary fact discovery shall remain open until 7/2/07; expert Discovery due by 8/1/2007. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Denny Chin. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 5/1/07) (dle) Modified on 5/3/2007 (rw).
February 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 2/23/07) (dle)
February 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19
ORDER granting 11 Motion to Seal Exhibit D is GRANTED. Exhibit D will be kept under seal. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 2/14/06) (db)
January 16, 2007 Filing 13
DECLARATION of Robert Brandon in Support re: 11 MOTION to Seal Ex. D to the Complaint.. Document filed by Madison Square Garden, L.P.. (Raskopf, Robert)
December 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9
ORDER that the clerk of the court shall forthwith place Exhibit D to the complaint in this action under seal pending further order of this court. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 12/13/06) (dle, )
October 6, 2006 Filing 8
ANSWER to Counterclaim. Document filed by Zipporah Films, Inc., Zipporah Films, Inc..(Hyman, Steven)
September 18, 2006 Filing 7
ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Zipporah Films, Inc.. Document filed by Madison Square Garden, L.P., Madison Square Garden Center, Inc..(Raskopf, Robert)
September 5, 2006 Filing 3
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Madison Square Garden, L.P. served on 8/29/2006, answer due 9/18/2006; Madison Square Garden Center, Inc. served on 8/29/2006, answer due 9/18/2006. Service was accepted by Chris Crane, Manager, Contract Adminstration. Document filed by Zipporah Films, Inc.. (Hyman, Steven)
August 25, 2006 Filing 2
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Zipporah Films, Inc..(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2006 (laq, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zipporah Films, Inc. v. Madison Square Garden, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zipporah Films, Inc.
Represented By: Deanna R. Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Square Garden, L.P.
Represented By: Robert Lloyd Raskopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Square Garden Center, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lloyd Raskopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Madison Square Garden, L.P.
Represented By: Robert Lloyd Raskopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Madison Square Garden Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Zipporah Films, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?