Coultrip et al v. Pfizer, Inc
Plaintiff: Heather Pfleegor, Valerie Elser-Stone, Lauren Brown, Tiffiny Boschee, Marisa Rose, Michael Hill Brown, Ralph Ciccarelli, Jr., Mark Palace, Kari Lemay Tyner, Jennifer Bresler, Latrice Morrison, Ruswantie Parasram, Monica Turner, Joel Stopha, Brian Failla, Matthew Chapman, Sherri Neal, Anne Eichengreen, Chris Matheny, Elvys Duarte, Kimberly Nichols, Deanine Mancini, Donnell L.W. Akins, Nancy Tipton, Nadia Kelly, Patrick M. Haisley, Gregory Hughes, Colin Alleyne, Richard W Bakerp, Rita Zoober, Sara Cecchini, Sylvie Roberge, Laura Maroney, Ryan Ferguson, Angelique Vereen, Erin Christie Harrill, Lauren Ragone, Dana Neumann, John Amburgy, Rebecca H Kent, Kevin Pinkowski, John Carney, Bruce Bischoff, Jason Yoxtheimer, Susanne Brooks, John Reynolds, Courtney Daglish, Amal Salameh, Jared Jaynes, Richard David Martin, William Cassell, Wendy Winstead, Stanley Johnson, Brad Pierce, Shawn Dean, Paul Brown, Obioma Nkwuo, Jacqueline Kennedy, Adalee Guzman Torres, Pamela S. Watson, Cynthia M. Atkins, Ashley Diep, Faith Dimuzio, Erinn Denise Urquiaga, Walter J Wallace, Antonio Perez, David A. Russell, Brian Horman, Nancy Carlino, Anna Childress, Todd A. Blackwelder, Wesley Kogelman, Kevin Morrison, James Tomasini, Rafat Emmanuel, Jennifer Soler, David Wicker, Monique Wright, Victoria H. Clark, Stacey Wilkins, P.W. G Hughes, Kimberly Stephenson, Firas R Dib, Susan E. Rubio, Staci Balanay, Paul Machowsky, Samantha Nardella, Harry L. Monk, John Callahan, Melissa Zumbach, Nikkole Watt, Mohammad Rashid, Danielle Weismiller, Chris B. Anderson, Latroy Caesar, Thomas Guy, Elizabeh Gwynne Johnson, Mark Yancey, Nancy Reimann, Michelle L. Fleshman, Sarah Parent, Toby Eastland, Kristine Bunch, June Krohn-Swift, Tykisha Davis, Lara Amoroso, Maria Elena Sanchez, Heather Cornwell, Rose M Bruckner, Samirah Lawson, Karen Duffy, Christopher Ecke, Marci Drimer, Julie Parker, Barbara Vilches-Cruz, Kevin Mills, Amy Long, Keith DeAgostine, Diana Simone, John W Carlton, Jan Courtney, Brenda C. Melendez Torres, Mark Walter, Dianna Cavalier, Brian Douglas Adams, Jacob Shuler, Breuf Matherly, Erroin A Martin, Lourdes M. Mestre, Brenda Gerdes, Craig Harris, Natalie Floro, Jodie Blindauer, Leslie Eden, Matthew George, Amanda Santaniello, Kalpana Daniel, Rhonda Mumby, Kristin Iverson, Yvonne Judice Douge, Nicole Williams, Docten Serralta, Lisa Bromfield, Judy Shepherd, Pamela Dedes, Rhonda Ripley, Jacqueline Woods, Christopher Raebel, David Macali, Marc Lederer, Hector Minguela, Nicholas Lentis, Kristin Runyan, Richard L. Goldman, Christian Boyce, Carmelo Padro, Greta Nowak, Mayra Abad, Deirdre Evavold, John P Thiem, Pamela Cubelic, Jennifer McMillen, Tina Brady, Jerica Olson, Thomas Elmore, Paulette Maltagliati, Paul Lacy, Jamie Galloway, Mark A. Beauchamp, Paul Ferrell, Steven Pine, Michael Williamson, Stephen Paccione, Brian Shea, Shelly Reva Johnson, Ralph M. Cox Martinez, John Kitchen, Joseph Bennett, Eric W Schffert, Zoila Margules, Gayle Jones, Kevin Mitchell, Michael Cody, David B. Shoby, Delrek Barge, Amiee Smith, Theresa Solari, Carrie Sheppard, Erica McKeon, Lovell Hooks, Mary Ann Soran, Thomas Ganim, Mark P. Casey, Alisa Allen, Jaime Garza, Erdoo Ngur, Johnnie Gevargesian, Yvonne Handel, Leslie C. Gregg, Chris Landry, Robert Cox, Anthony Accardi, Maria E. Rodriguez, Steven R Loggie, Barbara Ann Gruyan, Laura Warren, William Ratzsch, Christina Jordan, Ahmed Elnenaey, Dustin Caldwell, Lori L. Dodd, Ashely Grady, Jose Fco. Soto Rodriguez, Ryan Brown, Robert S. Howard III, Mark Morgan, Jay Bronder, Mark Ferris, Dave Beecham, Tiffany Einck Merrick, Craig McGinnis, Susan Cross, John Toner, Renee Stefanko, Jose Enrique Cunet Hilaldo, Dione Miller, Kristine Norris, Sherman Lane, Bryon Scott Jones, Richard Burnett, Michelle Guillaume, Boris C. Barlatier, Marla Lawrence, Christopher Farrell, Robert F Santa, Kimberly Ballentine, Jessica Nabongo, Marsha Connor, Krismely Santana-De Dios, Jessica Alline Neal, Rhonda Gonzales, Douglas Anderson, Timothy Moran, Deanna Hamilton, Stephan Swentkowsky, Anne M McGenough, William Quinn, Scot Van Steenburg, Janata Nancy, Gloria Ramirez, Robert Kuhter, Amy Kriznik, Rudolfo E. Polak, Matt Fryxell, Abigail May, Catherine Westling, Dominic Lio, Dominique Atkins, Trebor S Smith, Karen J Lindsey, Joseph M. DeMattia, Reinaldo Nieves-Pagan, Zach Rutten, Mary Frank, Margaret Morrison, Christine Moravits, William Dargan, Jeffery Luplow, Hongbao Pearson, Leslie Moeini, Donna Kondo, Donald Daily, Theodore James Werkeiser, II, Karl Carlson, Conor Bradley, Daniel Rubbo, Jr., Nanette O'Brien, Wendy Septembre, Kent Lancaster, JoAnne Keigel, Lisa R. Vorel, Joni Pentifallo, James Manuele, Charisse Merriwether, Chirstopher Minton, Julian C DeLehman, Kevin Gill, Sandra Squalls, Mary Walker, Robert Deluca, Berna Blake, Ryan Gillette and Donald Schultz
Case Number: 1:2006cv09952
Filed: October 19, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: James C Francis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2015 Filing 2933 SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 2907 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 05/04/2015.(mps)
May 4, 2015 Filing 2932 SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 2891 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 05/04/2015.(mps)
March 31, 2015 Filing 2931 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 2907 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 4/30/2015. (mps)
March 31, 2015 Filing 2930 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 2891 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 4/30/2015. (mps)
May 21, 2014 Filing 2929 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Todd Holder.(mro)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2928 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), by and between plaintiffs and defendant and is so ordered by the Court, that all claims interposed in the above-captioned actions, as well as the above-captioned actions, are dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own fees and costs.(Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/20/2012) (djc)
December 20, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Matthew Brinckerhoff Document (2927 in 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 43 in 1:07-cv-04532-JCF, 39 in 1:06-cv-15200-JCF) Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,, was referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis for approval. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF(ml)
December 19, 2012 Filing 2927 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) All Defendants pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Anthony Coultrip.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF(Brinckerhoff, Matthew) Modified on 12/20/2012 (ml).
November 14, 2012 Filing 2926 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tarsha Fitzgerald.(lmb)
July 31, 2012 Filing 2925 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
July 6, 2012 Filing 2924 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/22/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(mt)
July 6, 2012 Filing 2923 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 12/22/2011 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012.(mt)
June 28, 2012 Filing 2922 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, IV from Samuel Shapiro dated 6/28/2012 re: We represent plaintiffs in the above-captioned action. We write to respectfully request an extension of time to file a brief on the impact or the Supreme Court's decision in Christopher v. SmithKline Beecham Corp. on plaintiffs' motion for class certification until after the Court conference scheduled for July 20, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Briefing is held in abeyance pending the conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/28/2012) (djc)
June 6, 2012 Filing 2921 (REDACTED) CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sharon Piper.(lmb)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2920 MINUTE ORDER PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM FROM THE ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. COURTS, DATED JUNE 15TH, 1973....Case Closed administratively pursuant to Memorandum from the Administrative Office of the United States Courts dated June 15th, 1973.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/1/2012) (cd)
May 15, 2012 Filing 2919 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Samuel McDonald.(lmb)
April 3, 2012 Filing 2918 (REDACTED) CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scot Van Steenburg.(lmb)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2917 ORDER denying (2875) Motion to Certify Class in case 1:06-cv-09952-JCF. 1. All discovery is stayed pending the Supreme Court's determination in Christopher. 2. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification (Docket no. 2875) is denied without prejudice. It will be deemed renewed upon the papers already filed as of the date the Supreme Court issues its decision in Christopher. Counsel will then have fourteen (14) days to submit simultaneous briefs of no more than seven (7) pages each addressing the impact of Christopher on the class motion. It would be inefficient and confusing to issue a determination on class certification now only to hold the case in abeyance and potentially have to revisit the class decision after the Supreme Court issues its opinion. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF Copies Mailed By Chambers. (lmb)
December 21, 2011 Filing 2916 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christine Rose Sanders.(mro)
November 14, 2011 Filing 2915 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Shana Ferrigan.(mro)
November 4, 2011 Filing 2914 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Erica McKeon.(mro)
September 27, 2011 Filing 2913 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Holly Rich on behalf of Pfizer, Inc (Rich, Holly)
September 26, 2011 Filing 2912 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CONSENT TO JOIN FORM. Document filed by Richard Shigaki. (mro)
August 31, 2011 Received returned mail Mail was addressed to James A Jones 3402 Oak Groove Ave Suite 250 Dallas, TX 75204 and was returned for the following reason(s): Attempted Not Known. (jab)
August 26, 2011 Filing 2911 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Rodrick Madsen. *Envelope post marked 8/25/2011. (tro)
August 19, 2011 Filing 2910 DECLARATION of Samuel Shapiro in Support re: (2875 in 1:06-cv-09952-JCF) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Fernando Oblitas-Rios, Ayisha Jeter, Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF(Shapiro, Samuel)
August 19, 2011 Filing 2909 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Exhibit 22 - Overview of the Pfizer Selling Model, together with workshop participation guides served on Littler Mendelson, P.C. on 6/9/11. Document filed by Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip, Ayisha Jeter, Fernando Oblitas-Rios. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF(Shapiro, Samuel)
August 19, 2011 Filing 2908 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Exhibits 1, 3 and 4 to the Declaration of Samuel Shapiro served on Kimberly J. Gost on 8/18/11. Document filed by Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip, Ayisha Jeter, Fernando Oblitas-Rios. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF(Shapiro, Samuel)
August 19, 2011 Filing 2907 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
August 18, 2011 Filing 2906 DECLARATION of Samuel Shapiro in Support re: (2875 in 1:06-cv-09952-JCF) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Fernando Oblitas-Rios, Ayisha Jeter, Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF(Shapiro, Samuel)
August 18, 2011 Filing 2905 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2875 in 1:06-cv-09952-JCF) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Fernando Oblitas-Rios, Ayisha Jeter, Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF(Shapiro, Samuel)
August 15, 2011 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (2904 in 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 31 in 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 35 in 1:07-cv-04532-JCF) Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF(rjm)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2904 ORDER. Counsel having agreed that certain exhibits to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion for class certification contain confidential information, and there being good cause for filing them under seal, it is hereby ORDERED that Exhibits 32, 33, and 34 shall be filed under seal. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 8/15/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm)
August 2, 2011 Filing 2903 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Joint Form re: 772 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff. Document filed by Sonja Loadholt. [*Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, Copies sent to counsel on 8/12/2011.] (tro)
July 29, 2011 Filing 2900 NOTICE of Request for Oral Argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc. (Simmons, William)
July 29, 2011 Filing 2899 DECLARATION of William J. Simmons in Opposition re: #2875 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39)(Simmons, William)
July 29, 2011 Filing 2898 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #2875 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc. (Gost, Kimberly)
July 26, 2011 Filing 2897 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 19, 2011 Filing 2896 Letter from William r. Bowman Jr dated 7/7/11 re: It has come to my attention that my name was included in a lawsuit against my employer Pfizer, Inc. I never intended to join this suit. Please remove me from the class immediately. Document filed by William R. Bowman Jr.(mro)
July 14, 2011 Filing 2895 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jon V. Young. Postmarked 7/12/2011. (Letter of explanation of lateness attached).(tro)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2894 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, from William J. Simmons, dated 7/13/2011, re: Defendant requests an extension of one week, until Friday, July 29, 2011, to file its opposition to Plaintiffs' motion. In kind, Defendant also requests that the deadline for Plaintiffs to file their reply brief also be extended one week, until August 18, 2011. Plaintiffs' counsel have given their full consent regarding this request. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 7/29/2011. Replies due by 8/18/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/13/2011) (ja) Modified on 7/18/2011 (ja).
July 7, 2011 Filing 2893 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Join Form. Document filed by Stacy Barbara. (mro)
June 22, 2011 Filing 2892 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jana Wright.(mbe)
June 22, 2011 Filing 2891 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2890 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from William J. Simmons dated 6/21/11 re: counsel writes on behalf of the parties that Defendant now respectfully requests that Exhibit 22 retain its "Confidential" designation and that the Court enter an order directing Plaintiffs to file Exhibit 22 under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/21/11) (pl) Modified on 6/22/2011 (pl).
June 10, 2011 Filing 2889 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Allison Barnes. (Postmark of 6/7/2011.)(mbe)
June 10, 2011 Filing 2881 DECLARATION of Elizabeth S. Saylor in Support re: #2875 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip, Ayisha Jeter, Fernando Oblitas-Rios. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, Part 1, #20 Exhibit 19, Part 2, #21 Exhibit 19, Part 3, #22 Exhibit 19, Part 4, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, Part 1, #25 Exhibit 21, Part 2, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31)(Saylor, Elizabeth)
June 9, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Elizabeth S. Saylor. Document Nos. [2877-2879] Exhibits. These documents are not filed via ECF. Exhibits may only be added as Attachments. (db)
June 9, 2011 Filing 2880 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #2875 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip, Ayisha Jeter, Fernando Oblitas-Rios. (Saylor, Elizabeth)
June 9, 2011 Filing 2879 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Elizabeth S. Saylor in Support re: #2875 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip, Ayisha Jeter, Fernando Oblitas-Rios. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21-1, #2 Exhibit 21-2, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 26, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31)(Saylor, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/10/2011 (db).
June 9, 2011 Filing 2878 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Elizabeth S. Saylor in Support re: #2875 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip, Ayisha Jeter, Fernando Oblitas-Rios. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19-3, #2 Exhibit 19-4, #3 Exhibit 20)(Saylor, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/10/2011 (db).
June 9, 2011 Filing 2877 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Elizabeth S. Saylor in Support re: #2875 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip, Ayisha Jeter, Fernando Oblitas-Rios. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19-1, #4 Exhibit 19-2)(Saylor, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/10/2011 (db).
June 9, 2011 Filing 2876 FILING ERROR - DEFIIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Elizabeth Saylor in Support re: #2875 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Benaias Albarran, Amanda Charmane Boal, Angela Cohenp, Anthony Coultrip, Ayisha Jeter, Fernando Oblitas-Rios. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Saylor, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/10/2011 (db).
June 9, 2011 Filing 2875 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Mayra Abad, P. Nelida Abdelnour, John Abdoo, Janine Abisch, Lisa Abraham, Michael Abraham, Hillary J. Abrams, Anthony Accardi, Scott J. Aceto, Scott Aceto, Tricia Acosta, Lynsey Adame, Darren R Adams, Ranita Adams, Robert Adams, Shirley Adams, Timothy W Adams, James Addis, Toba Adina-Jao, Jerome O. Adkins, Shannon Adkins, Richard C. Adrian, Robert Agranov, John Aguero, Thomas M Ahif Jr., Chad Ahlstrom, Yunos Ahmady, Donnell L.W. Akins, Alec Alba, Benaias Albarran, Steven Alberti, Mitchell Alberto, Brooke Albright, Tracie Alch, James Alexander, Jody Alexander, Tamika Alexander, Ronald M. Alexis, Ryan Aleya, Carrie Alfieri, Leyla Ali, Cameron Allan, Alisa Allen, Brandon K. Allen, Charles I Allen, Michael Allen, Robert Allen, Robert L. Allen, Jr, Scott Allen, Scott Anthony Allen, Terri Allen, Amy Alley, Joshua Alley, Colin Alleyne, Darlene J. Allison, Jane Allums, Jose Almaraz, Ardena Alston, Jose Amador, William Amato, Matthew Amberg, John Amburgy, Elizabeth Amici, Marc Ammann, Monica Ammerman, Lara Amoroso, Courtney Amos, Adrianne Anderson, Ann Anderson, Chris B. Anderson, Douglas Anderson, Jeanette Anderson, Lisa Anderson, Mary Anderson, Mikael Anderson, Scott E. Anderson, Yuette A Anderson, Travis Andre, Bourgoyne Andree, Rosalind Andry, Anthony Andujar, John S Anecharico, Robert Angie, Jr, Marc Anish, David Anthony, Susan J. Aquino-McMahon, Joan Arabie, Jill Arcuri, Amy Armstrong, CarrieAnn Arnold, Kimberly Arnold, Stephanie Arnold, Eric Aroca, Kimberly Arouth, M. Jay Arthur, Cynthia M. Atkins, Dominique Atkins, James B Atwater, Mark D Auckner, Giuseppe Audino, Pamela Austin, Tracey Avert, Ronald T. Avilla, Molly Axline, Amy Ayers, Peter Azzaretti, Brian Bachelder, John Bachman, Cory Baer, Karen I Baglama, Roy Baiamonte, Elizabeth Bailey, Jessica Bailey, Rebecca Bailey, Angela Bailey-Hardy, Jessica Baillargeon, Renis Thurston Baker, Sherry D. Baker, Richard W Bakerp, Carol Balabushka, Lois Balala, Freddie Balanay, Staci Balanay, Mark Baldari, Juan Jesus Baldivia, Sandra Baldonado, Raelene Balidoy, Susan K. Ball, Kimberly Ballentine, Robert Banez, Melissa Bankes, Nathan M Banks, Deryll Banning, Stacy T. Barbara, Kyla Barber, John Barcelona, Jennifer Bardwell, Delrek Barge, Yolanda Barham, Mariah Barker, Veronica M Barker, Thomas Barklage, Boris C. Barlatier, Robert Barlow, Catherine Barnard, Nicole Barnes, James Barnett, Tracey Barnett, Kristen Barr, Stephen J. Barron, Bernadette Barsch, David Bartell, Michael Bartholomew, Alan Bartlett, Leslie Barton, David Baruka, Gail Denise Bash, Cristina Basquez, Jennifer Bass, Donna M. Bates, Steven Bath, Sonja Bauer, Michelle Baumer, Norman Baumgardner, Holly Baynes, Edwin J. Bayron, Brian Beach, Theron Bean, Daniel Beany, Mark A. Beauchamp, Duy Beck, Denise Ann Becker, Nathan Beckett, Dave Beecham, Terri L. Begun, Brian Bell, Coleman Bell, Tressa Bell, Tyrone W. Bell, Brion K. Beller, Noah Beller, Katherine Belles, James J Bellush, Robert Benn, Donna L. Bennett, Joseph Bennett, Paula Benson Clements, Madeleine Benthin, James O. Benton, Jr, Claudia Beqaj, Andrew T. Berkowitz, Alan Berlow, Carl Berry, Christine Berry, Christina Besemann, Christina Ann Besemann, Aaron D. Bessonette, Fred Betzold, Tanya Y. Beuchamp, Rob Bickett, Jennifer Bielecki, Amelia Bigelow, Edward Binderup, Konnie Binno, Stacy Binyon, Nicole Bir, Helen L Birch, Bruce Bischoff, Joseph Bishop, Laura Bissell, Gene Bittel, Daniel Bitter, Jon Black, Bess Blackburn, Todd A. Blackwelder, Todd Blackwelder, Todd A Blackwelder, David H. Blackwell, Ann Morris Blah, David Blair, Nicole Blair, Berna Blake, Tanisha Blake, Hilary Blakely, Lee Blakely, Maria Lizette Blandon-Bisbal, Solangie Sonabria Blas, John Bledsoe, Jodie Blindauer, Kimberly Blohowiak, Jamye Bloom-McIntyre, Alton J. Blunschi, Amanda Charmane Boal, Brian Boatman, Roberts R Bobby, Meredith Bochim, Joseph F Bogdan, Chris Bogle, Naomi Boinus-Reehorst, Liesl Bold, Timothy J. Boldt, Trent R Bolesky, Shannon Bolton, Tyrun Bond, Mark Bonsmann, Loy Booker, Kelly Boon, Daryl Boothe, Deborah Borden, Amy Borgerding, Tiffiny Boschee, Andy Boseck, Dennis Boston, David Bottario, Robin Boudreau, Alexis Bouhoutsos, Bethany Boulter, Roy A. Bouwmeester, Shawn D. Bowers, William Bowers, Jeffrey Bowles, Abby Bowlin, William R. Bowman, Jr, Christian Boyce, William Boyce, Kristi Boyd, Leslie Boyd, Kenneth S Boyer, John Boyle, Todd A. Bozeman, Conor Bradley, Henrietta Bradley, Tracey J. Bradley, William Bradshaw, Tina Brady, Tabatha Brantley, Dusty Brasfield, Christopher Brattelli, Matthew Brauns, Robert Breakiron, Dustin Bredthauer, Elizabeth Bredy Clark, Matt Bremehr, Gregory Brenner, Jennifer Bresler, Theresa Brice, Lee Bridges, Ron Brigel, Kristen Briggs, Paula Bright, Rosalyn Bright-Bell, Norman Briones, Natalie Britt, Charles Lee Bro, Amie Brockway, Seth Brodsky, Elizabeth Brody, Lisa Bromfield, Beau Bronder, Jay Bronder, Cara Brooks, Henna Brooks, Herbert L Brooks, Lisa Brooks, Shawn Brooks, Susanne Brooks, Timothy Brosnihan, Anne Marie Brostowitz, Jeff Brouwer, Deborah Brower, Brandon Brown, Charlita Brown, Chris Brown, Craig Brown, Delores Brown, Frank Brown, Jacqueline Brown, Jason Brown, Lauren Brown, Luke Brown, Marcus Brown, Paul Brown, Ryan Brown, Melissa L. Brown, Mark Browning, Jeffrey Brownley, Jonathan Brucato, Mark Bruckner, Rose M Bruckner, Stephen Brudzewski, Krista Bruen, Jason Brumm, Kyle Brunen, Stacy Bruner, Sabrina Brunson, Andrew Bruone, Heather Bryan, Christopher Brynczka, Tina Buccola, Kathryn Buch, Kristin Buchanan, Lori Buchanan, Olga Buchanan, Scarlet Buchanan, Jason Buckley, Loretta Budd, Brent L Buehler, Jeffrey G Buehrle, Marcus Buffaloe, Gordon Stewart Bunch, Jeremy Bunch, Kristine Bunch, Nicole C Bur, Margaret Buran, Jay Burch, Gerald Burgeson, Dwight Burgess, David M Burick, Michelle Burke, Haydiee P Burkes, Richard Burnett, Barbara Burnette, Amy Burns, Cheron Burns, Angela M Burnside, Jamie Burrell, James G Burroughs, Scott Burrows, Denise Burt, Robert Butlowski, Eric Bylan, David Byrd, Edward Byrd, Jace D Cabezut, Leann Cable, Herminio Cabrera, Kay Caccamo, Angela Cacciatore McLaughlin, Latroy Caesar, Robert M. Cafaro, Tara Cafaro, Jennifer Cafferelli, Suzanne M Calabro, Jennifer Calderin-Ludwig, Dustin Caldwell, Buck Calfy, Ashley Calhoun, John Callahan, Catherine Calloway, Anthony Calo, Marnee Camp, Yvonne Camp, Brett Campbell, Kelsey Canady, Tamara Cannon, Matthew Capobianco, James Cardillo, Charles Carey, Jody Carkhuff, Nancy Carlino, Michael Wayne Carlo, Eric Carlson, Karl Carlson, Michelle Carlson, John W Carlton, John Carney, Marie Carolan, David P Carothers, Sandra Carovano, Lisa Marie Carpenter, Christopher Carr, Tania Carrell, Frank Carrico, Matthew Carroll, Lisa Carson, John Carstens, Kristine Caruso, Timothy Cascino, Mark P. Casey, William Cassell, Lydia Gies Castagna, Miozoty Castillo, Kenyon Catchings, Brandi Cather, Dianna Cavalier, Matt Cavalier, Sheila Cawmon, Sara Cecchini, Robert Cella, Jasen Chadwick, Ricky Chahal, Timothy Chain, Robert Chall, Olga E. Chama, Tracey Mason Chamberlin, Andrew Chambers, Elizabeth K Chambers, Donovan Chance, Pavan Chandra, Thomas Chang, Douglas Chapman, Gabriel Chapman, Matthew Chapman, Cathy Charbonnet, Kristina Charles, Alan Chase, George Chavez, Jabbar Cheathem, Robert Chenault, Jonathan Cheney, Bonnie Cheung, Elizabeth Childers, Anna Childress, Aaron Chipley, Sherry Choate, Archana Chokshi, Kristi Chop, Raymond C. Chop, Dinesh Chopra, Jackson Choy, Jason Christensen, Matthew Christopherson, Ralph Ciccarelli, Jr, Alane M. Cicchitto, Krzysztof Cieslik, Carolyn Cho Clahan, Dorinda D. Clark, Joseph Clark, Larissa Clark, Reid Clark, Theresa Michelle Clark, Treehern Clark, Victoria H. Clark, Larry Clay, Brian Cleary, Dawn Clemence, Antonio Clements, Paula Clements, Brigid Clevenger, Jennifer Clifton, Thomas Albert Clobes, Julie Cobourn Mueller, Nicole Cochran, Michael Cody, Mary Coffon, Greg Cohen, Jade Cohen, Mindy J Cohen, Angela Cohenp, Paige Coker, Kathleen Colarusso, Jessica Cole, Robin Cole, Traci Cole, Christina Coleman, Robert Coleman, Trace G. Collier, Zachary Collier, Patrick J. Colligon, Cecil Collins, Ralph B. Collins, Jr, Robert Colontrelle, Alexandra Colvin, Richard Combs, Michelle Comer-Saucer, James Conklin, Patricia A Connell, Laurie Conner, Marsha Connor, Kevin Console, Marlies Cook, Michelle Cook, Bill Coolidge, Susan Cooney-Ghirsig, Christina S. Cooper, Stanley Cooper, Christina Copeland, Pamela Copus, Melissa M Corcoran, Jason R Cordova, C Cordray, Jayson Ryan Cormier, Kara Cornacchio, Heather Cornwell, Diana Corry, Laura Corwin, Nick Costa, Richard Costello, Nathan Cote, Leslie Cotte, Julio Antonio Cotto Cruz, Wayne Coulter, Anthony Coultrip, Jan Courtney, Maria Coutee, Todd A. Coverdale, Lenora Covington, Christopher Cox, Karen A. Cox, Robert Cox, Ralph M. Cox Martinez, Patrice Craig, Joseph Crandall, Davaree Crawford, Mildred Crawford, Scott T. Crawford, Marion Creighton, Dana Creller, Karen Crespo, Justin Crockett, John Croft, John R. Croft, Brendan Crooker, Susan Cross, Michael Crouch, Tegan Crouch, K Suri Crowe, Shane Crowell, Anne B. Crump, Myra L. Crutchfield, Yania Cruz, David Cruz Rivera, Pamela Cubelic, Christian Culver, Thomas K. Cumm, Diane Cummings, Jose Enrique Cunet Hilaldo, James Cuoco, Brian W. Curoe, Joseph Stephen Curoe, John Curran, Jennifer Curren, Grant Cussans, Amy Cyman, Claudia D'Larotta, Angela Dabney, Dan J. Dagerman, Courtney Daglish, Jeffrey Dahms, Donald Daily, Yehia Dajani, David E Dale, Franklin Daleo, Jennifer Damm, Fred Damuth, James Dane, Amir Daneshvar, Kristen Daniel, Kalpana Daniel, Isabel Daniels, Michael Daniels, Monica Daniely, Theodore Danzer, Jennifer Dardis, William Dargan, Tori Dargati, Christopher Darling, Sanjeev Datta, Darline Davermann-Reid, Jauron G. David, Melissa Davidian, Heather L Davidson, James Davidson, Jennifer Davidson, Kenneth Davidson, Amy Davis, Carl Davis, Conrad Davis, Derrick Davis, Dustin M. Davis, Elizabeth Davis, Erica Davis, Grady S Davis, Gregory K Davis, Gregory Z. Davis, John Davis, Kristy Davis, Lisa G. Davis, Robert Davis, Scott Davis, Tykisha Davis, Elizabeth Davtian, Todd Dawson, Shanti Daya, James De Anda, Lina De La Cruz- San Inocencio, Keith DeAgostine, Richard DeBellis, Brook
June 7, 2011 Filing 2887 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Natasha Chan. (Postmark 6/6/2011)(mbe)
June 7, 2011 Filing 2886 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Nicole Marlowe Quinlan. (Postmark of 6/4/2011)(mbe)
June 7, 2011 Filing 2884 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Rickey Hall. (Postmark date 6/3/2011.)(mbe)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2874 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Elizabeth S. Saylor dated 6/2/2011 re: Counsel for plaintiffs writes jointly with defendants request permission to file over-sized briefs and for permission to delay the filing of confidential materials. The request is for permission to file a forty (40) Page opening brief and a twenty-five (25) page reply brief. Defendant requests permission to file a (40) forty (40) page opposition brief. Both parties consent to these enlargements. Counsel requests requests permission that the parties be permitted to file on ECF on the date that the papers are due only exhibits that have not been marked confidential. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/2/11) (js)
June 2, 2011 Filing 2885 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Join Form re: 391 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff. Document filed by Constantine Metros. [Accepted for filing on 6/6/2011 by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis.] (tro)
June 2, 2011 Filing 2883 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Andrea C. Hampton. (Postmarked 5/24/2011)(tro)
June 2, 2011 Filing 2882 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Holly Stuart. (Postmarked 5/27/2011)(tro)
May 23, 2011 Filing 2872 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James M. John, Jr. Postmarked 5/20/2011, letter attached with explanation that due to change of address/move the consent form was submitted late. (tro)
May 23, 2011 Filing 2871 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Thad A. Welch. Envelope attached, no postmark indicated. (tro)
May 23, 2011 Filing 2778 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Thad A. Welch.(mbe)
May 17, 2011 Filing 2870 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susan J. Aquino-McMahon. Postmarked 5/12/2011. (tro)
May 16, 2011 Filing 2873 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephan Swentkowsky. Postmarked 5/4/2011. (tro)
May 10, 2011 Filing 2888 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Join Form re: 1680 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff. Document filed by Antonio Perez. [Accepted for filing on 5/31/2011 by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis.] (tro)
May 9, 2011 Filing 2869 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Denise Hansen. Postmarked 5/3/2011. (tro)
May 6, 2011 Filing 2868 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Darline Davermann-Reid. Envelope attached, no postmark indicated. (tro)
May 6, 2011 Filing 2867 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephanie Ridgeway. Postmarked 5/3/2011.(tro)
May 6, 2011 Filing 2866 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Yunos Ahmady. Postmarked 5/2/2011. (tro)
May 6, 2011 Filing 2865 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Steve Westendorf. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
May 6, 2011 Filing 2668 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Jason Hill on behalf of Ayisha Jeter, Fernando Oblitas-Rios (Hill, James)
May 6, 2011 Filing 2664 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Douglas Cohelan on behalf of Ayisha Jeter, Fernando Oblitas-Rios (Cohelan, Timothy)
May 5, 2011 Filing 2864 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bradley Rosecke. Postmarked 5/2/2011. (tro)
May 5, 2011 Filing 2863 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Boris C. Barlatier. Postmarked 5/4/2011. (tro)
May 4, 2011 Filing 2862 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Kane. Envelope attached, postmark partially illegible. (tro)
May 4, 2011 Filing 2861 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ryan Ferguson. Postmarked 4/30/2011. (tro)
May 3, 2011 Filing 2860 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susan Mc Eneany. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
May 3, 2011 Filing 2859 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James Dodd. Postmarked 4/27/2011. (tro)
May 3, 2011 Filing 2858 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mary Laura Gillette. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
May 3, 2011 Filing 2857 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Darryl Hollimon. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
May 3, 2011 Filing 2856 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Danny Ng. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
May 2, 2011 Filing 2855 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Join Form re: 243 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff. Document filed by Breanna O'Toole. *Accepted for filing by the Honorable James C. Francis on 5/4/2011. (tro)
April 28, 2011 Filing 2853 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Peto.Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 28, 2011 Filing 2852 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Deborah Quirk. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 28, 2011 Filing 2851 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kimberly Szymanski. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 28, 2011 Filing 2850 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David D. Ulrich. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 28, 2011 Filing 2848 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alan Williams. Envelope attached, no postmark indicated(tro) Modified on 5/27/2011 (tro).
April 27, 2011 Filing 2854 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Clorris Sthole. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2849 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Andrea Hampton. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2847 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Hughes. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2846 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Janice Hess. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2845 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dinesh Chopra. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2844 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laura Morton. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2843 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lana Gee. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2842 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jessica Guenzel. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2841 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laurel Igbanugo. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2840 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dorothy Rubino. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2839 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Samwell. Envelope attached, no postmark indicated. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2838 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Erin Olsen. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2837 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Vickie Mrotek. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2836 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert Orzechowski. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2835 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lee Blakely. Postmarked 4/20/2011.(tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2834 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard Patrick. Postmarked 4/20/2011.(tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2833 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David DeLeon. Envelope attached, no postmark indicated.(tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2832 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Norman E. Jewell. Postmarked 4/21/2011.(tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2831 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Pamela Lynch. Postmarked 4/20/2011.(tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2830 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Parker. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2829 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mary Hrustich. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro) Modified on 5/31/2011 (tro).
April 27, 2011 Filing 2828 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Adrienne Webb. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2827 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Winfred Wayne Welborn. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2826 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Eric C. Gardner. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2825 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer LeMasters. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2824 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kari Lemay Tyner. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro) Modified on 5/26/2011 (tro).
April 27, 2011 Filing 2823 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laurie Holsman. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2822 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa Teff. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2821 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Harrington. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2819 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jimmisue Margoni. Envelope attached, no postmark indicated. (tro)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2818 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Deidre Woodard. Envelope attached, no postmark indicated. (tro) Modified on 5/26/2011 (tro).
April 27, 2011 Filing 2674 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Juan M. Lopez Santiago. (No Envelope Attached)(ama)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2673 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Bardwell. (No Envelope Attached)(ama)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2672 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Cruz Rivera. (No Envelope Attached)(ama)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2671 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Emily Ingram. (No Envelope Attached)(ama)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2670 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Bell. (No Envelope Attached)(ama)
April 27, 2011 Filing 2669 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Patrick M. Haisley. (No Envelope Attached)(ama)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2820 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Craig Scott Martin. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2817 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Dargan. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2816 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Reuben C. Press. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2815 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brooke Manheimer. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2814 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Thomas Elmore. Postmarked 4/16/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2813 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Earnest Millhouse. POstmarked 4/15/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2812 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Derrick Davis. Postmarked 4/16/2011.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2811 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Chelsea McAlexander. Postmarked 4/16/2011.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2810 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Wesley Maynard. Postmarked 4/15/2011.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2809 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Sheldon. Postmarked 4/18/2011(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2808 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stacey Jackson. Postmarked 4/18/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2807 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rafat Emmanuel. Postmarked date not legible. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2806 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brandon Storman. Postmarked 4/12/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2805 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julie Rowland. Postmarked 4/12/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2804 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin Sheron. Postmarked 4/12/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2803 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nicole Jones. Postmarked 4/12/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2802 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Emily Ingram. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2801 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jamye Bloom-McIntyre. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2800 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lauren Decker. Envelope attached, no postmark indicated. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2799 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tiffany Einck Merrick. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2798 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Maria E. Rodriguez. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2797 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ilana Rosenblatt.Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2796 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by K Suri Crowe.Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2795 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lisa Wilhelms. Postmarked 4/14/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2794 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James H. Lefebvre.Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2793 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brenda C. Melendez Torres.Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2792 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Karen Crespo. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2791 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tanya Y. Beuchamp.Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2790 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Solangie Sonabria Blas. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2789 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Raul Oquendo de Jesus. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2788 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alexis Koss Nasr. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2787 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard David Martin. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2786 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Arlene Oms Nazario. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2785 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Hector Minguela. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2784 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Schaeufele.Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2783 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susan Martinez. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2782 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephen J. Barron. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2781 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Peter Joseph Saccu. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2780 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Johnnie Tangle, III. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2779 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ronald T. Avilla. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2777 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tina Brady. Postmarked 4/20/11.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2776 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Zenaida Perez. Postmarked 4/21/11.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2775 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Adalee Guzman Torres. Postmarked 4/21/11.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2774 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Donna M. Bates. Postmarked 4/21/11.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2773 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John D. Whittington. Postmarked 4/21/11.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2772 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Keith Thompson. Postmarked 4/21/11.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2771 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James Hallman. Postmarked 4/21/11.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2770 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa Lode. Postmarked 4/21/11.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2769 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amy Burns. Postmarked 4/21/11.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2768 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joe N. Rieves, II.(tro) Postmarked 4/21/11. Modified on 5/20/2011 (tro).
April 26, 2011 Filing 2767 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lynn Kalb.Postmarked 4/22/11.(tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2766 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jacquelyn Kennedy. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2765 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Gilmore. Postmarked 4/15/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2764 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carl Strumillo. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2763 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marlies Cook. Postmarked 4/12/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2762 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Paul Scartelli. Postmarked 4/13/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2761 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Ross. Postmarked 4/12/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2760 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rosilyn Gregory. Envelope attached, no postmark indicated. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2759 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Christensen. Postmarked 4/12/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2758 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard Costello. Envelope attached, no postmark indicated. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2757 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Patricia Wilcox. Postmarked 4/12/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2756 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Judith Pinney. Postmarked 4/13/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2755 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Leslie Barton. Postmarked 4/12/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2754 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ellin Ede. Postmarked 4/13/2011. (tro)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2634 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James B. Williams, Jr.(ama)(Postmarked Envelope 4/23/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 26, 2011 Filing 2626 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Neil Epstein.(ama)(Postmarked Envelope 4/25/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 26, 2011 Filing 2624 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jill Strub.(ama)(Postmarked Envelope 4/22/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 26, 2011 Filing 2623 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Leslie Felix.(ama) (Postmarked Envelope 4/22/2011)Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 26, 2011 Filing 2622 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kim Shelton.(ama) (Postmarked Envelope 4/22/2011)Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 25, 2011 Filing 2753 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bennie Thompson. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2752 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Patricia Romeo. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2751 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scott Anthony Allen.(tro)Postmarked 4/21/2011. Modified on 5/18/2011 (tro).
April 25, 2011 Filing 2750 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephen Morgan Eudy. Postmarked 4/21/2011(tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2749 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Charlita Brown. Postmarked 4/21/2011.(tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2748 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Moulton. Postmarked 4/21/2011(tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2747 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Darrell J. Smith. Postmarked 4/21/2011(tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2746 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rhonda Rene Fox. Postmarked 4/20/2011(tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2745 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer S. Vannatta. Postmarked 4/20/2011(tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2744 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lynn Kristy. Postmarked 4/21/2011(tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2743 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kenneth Davidson.Postmarked 4/20/2011(tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2742 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joanne M. Tomanchek. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2741 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian W. Curoe. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2740 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Karen Ginter. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2739 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa Wilson. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro) Modified on 5/11/2011 (tro).
April 25, 2011 Filing 2738 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Valerie L. Mire.(tro) Postmarked 4/20/2011. Modified on 5/11/2011 (tro).
April 25, 2011 Filing 2705 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julie Cobourn Mueller. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2704 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robin Boudreau. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2703 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian J. Hogan. Postmarked 4/18/2011. (tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2701 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nayde M. Vazquez Fuentes. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2699 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Henrietta Bradley. Postmarked 4/21/2011.(tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2698 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scott Smith. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2667 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alvitta Leffall.(ama) (No Envelope Attached)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2666 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard Rossell.(ama)(No Envelope Attached)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2665 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michele Rosa.(ama)(No Envelope Attached)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2663 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lina De La Cruz- San Inocencio.(ama) (No Envelope Attached)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2662 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gregory D. Garcia.(ama)(No Envelope Attached)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2661 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ranita Adams.(ama) (No Envelope Attached)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2660 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Demond Antwan Nash.(ama)(No Envelope Attached)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2659 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christina Ann Besemann.(ama) (No Envelope Attached)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2658 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julie Cobourn Mueller.(ama) (No Envelope Attached)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2635 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robin Hosley.(ama)
April 25, 2011 Filing 2618 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David A. Russell.(ama)(Postmarked Envelope 4/22/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 25, 2011 Filing 2617 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alec Alba.(ama)(Postmarked Envelope 4/22/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 25, 2011 Filing 2616 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Todd Blackwelder.(ama)(Postmarked Envelope 4/22/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 25, 2011 Filing 2615 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin Knight.(ama) (Postmarked Envelope 4/22/2011)Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 24, 2011 Filing 2697 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin Console. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2696 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Hilary Blakely. Postmarked 4/21/2011.(tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2695 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rosilynn Hopkins. Postmarked 4/21/2011.(tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2694 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Hannah Fernandez. Postmarked 4/21/2011.(tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2693 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laura Hanson. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2692 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Charles Schlottmann. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2691 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michelle Comer-Saucer. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2690 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marlon Rochee. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2689 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Beth Farber. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2688 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tracey J. Bradley. Postmarked 4/21/2011.(tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2687 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristin Runyan. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2686 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julie Wellman-Phillips. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 24, 2011 Filing 2685 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carla Stiner-Reel. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2737 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David H. Blackwell. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2736 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sarah Miller. (envelope postmarked: 4/21/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2735 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Donna L. Bennett. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2734 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dominick Menotti. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2733 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jacqueline Ferree. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2732 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Paul Edward Price.(envelope postmarked: 4/18/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2731 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ragne M. Troche Vientos. (envelope postmark: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2730 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jamila K. McCoy. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2729 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by George Nennstiel. (envelope postmarked 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2728 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gary Munoz. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2727 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Heather Heist. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2726 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristin Fenn. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2725 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Cleary. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2724 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brook DeBuys. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2723 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Wendy Winstead. ( No envelope postmarked) (ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2722 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julie Frost. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2721 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James Quisenberry. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2720 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark Bonsmann. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2719 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristina Charles. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2718 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Bowers. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2717 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Kozel. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2716 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lori Buchanan. ( no postmarked envelope) (ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2715 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark Michaelis. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2714 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Orville Maclin. (no postmark on the envelope)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2713 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard Smith. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2712 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard Robinson. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2711 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anne Gorman. (envelope postmarked: 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2710 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Docten Serralta. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2709 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kelly Stinson. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2708 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lisa Simmons. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2707 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tracy Evans. (envelope postmarked: 4/18/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2706 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dawn Dorn. (envelope postmarked: 4/19/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2702 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joan Keel. (envelope postmarked: 4/18/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2700 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Steven Pine.(ama)(envelope postmarked 4/19/2011) Modified on 5/9/2011 (ama).
April 22, 2011 Filing 2684 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jauron G. David. Postmarked 4/19/2011. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2683 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Caroline Casey Malloy. Postmarked 4/19/2011. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2682 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristi Chop. Postmarked 4/19/2011. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2681 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa Hayden. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2680 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sean Gallman. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2679 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cassandra Riley-Hart. Postmarked 4/19/2011. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2678 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Edward G. Seaburg. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2677 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marc Ammann. Postmarked 4/19/2011. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2676 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Khandice Taylor. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2675 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alison McLauhlin. (Envelope Postmarked 4/20/2011)(ama)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2657 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carl Davis.(ama)(Envelope Postmarked4/20/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 22, 2011 Filing 2656 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Kang.(ama) (Envelope Postmarked 4/19/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 22, 2011 Filing 2655 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julia Roberts.(ama)(Envelope Postmarked 4/20/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 22, 2011 Filing 2654 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Danielle Stevens.(ama) Envelope attached, not postmarked. Modified on 5/6/2011 (tro).
April 22, 2011 Filing 2653 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bryant Kirby.(ama) Postmark Illegible.
April 22, 2011 Filing 2652 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amy Kassouf.(ama) Postmarked 4/19/2011.
April 22, 2011 Filing 2651 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lori Peckham.(ama) Postmarked 4/18/2011. Modified on 5/6/2011 (tro).
April 22, 2011 Filing 2650 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ahmed Elnenaey.(ama)(Envelope Postmarked 4/22/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 22, 2011 Filing 2649 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Yvette Peterson.(ama) Postmarked 4/21/2011. Modified on 5/6/2011 (tro).
April 22, 2011 Filing 2646 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jonathan Cheney.(ama)(Postmarked Envelope Illegible) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 22, 2011 Filing 2640 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Waldrop. (ab)(Envelope with no Postmark) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ama).
April 22, 2011 Filing 2632 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Devin Dobson. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (ab)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2631 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Edwin J. Bayron. Postmarked 4/19/2011. (ab)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2630 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Emily Ingram. Postmarked 4/21/2011. (ab)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2629 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Courtney Amos. (ab)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2628 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Todd A. Bozeman. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (ab)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2627 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Bailey. (ab)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2625 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Johnson. Postmarked 4/19/2011. (ab)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2621 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dennis Correa Lopez. Postmarked 4/20/2011. (ab)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2620 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jerrold Thomas Johnson. Post-marked: 4/20/2011. (ab)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2619 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joseph Stephen Curoe. (ab)
April 22, 2011 Filing 2416 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Join Form re: 2371 Letter. Plaintiff was removed from this action on 4/14/2011, pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (tro)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2392 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Samuel Shapiro dated 4/21/2011 re: Plaintiffs' respectfully request that their moving papers be filed no later than 6/9/2011; that defendant's opposition papers be filed no later than 7/22/11; and that plaintiffs' reply papers be filed no later than 8/11/11. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/22/2011) (jfe) Modified on 6/1/2011 (jfe). Modified on 6/1/2011 (jfe).
April 21, 2011 Filing 2645 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Patrice Gayden.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2644 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Street.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2613 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bobby Smith. (ab)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2612 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Abigial May. (ab)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2601 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Riccardi.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2600 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Reinaldo Nieves-Pagan.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2599 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Aristides Garcia Perez.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2598 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Arturo Nieves-Pagan.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2597 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark Pietz.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2596 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Timothy R. Tribble.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2595 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susan M. Murray.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2594 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Walker.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2593 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Allan Thompson.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2592 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gregory Hall.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2591 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Celeste Toneatti.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2590 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Eugene Henley.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2589 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Colleen Pacquing.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2588 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mikael Anderson.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2587 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anessa Sherrod.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2586 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Aimee Slone.(ama)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2581 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melinda Ferreira.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2580 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anna Childress.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2579 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Deanine Mancini.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2578 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Chad Ahlstrom.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2577 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Matthew Hart.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2576 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard Klotz.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2575 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Frederick Lunsford.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2574 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Sekulski.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2573 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christopher Raebel.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2565 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jacquelyn Purcell.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2564 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ingrid Class Maceila.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2563 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jose Salcedo Velez.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2562 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Victoria H. Clark.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2561 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Yania Cruz.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2560 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jose Enrique Cunet Hilaldo.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2559 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ralph M. Cox Martinez.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2558 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marti Felder.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2557 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nancy Zincio.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2556 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa Scholl.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2555 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James Cuoco.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2554 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Krista Bruen.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2553 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Angela Bailey-Hardy.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2552 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Dusse.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2551 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joseph McGreen.(tro)
April 21, 2011 Filing 2373 CONSENT TO JOIN CLASS. Document filed by Emily Ingram.(Saylor, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2648 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sandra Squalls.(ama)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2647 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Gwynne Johnson.(ama)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2636 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mayra Abad. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2633 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jose Fco. Soto Rodriguez. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2611 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Crouch. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2610 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Curren. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2609 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Curren. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2608 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Giuseppe Audino. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2607 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Hairston. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2606 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gregory Z. Davis. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2605 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jonathan Frei. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2604 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert D. McWilliams. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2603 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Todd Russo. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2602 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Terri L. Begun. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2585 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Patti Matzkin. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2584 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Douglas R. Peterson. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2583 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susan Stafford. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2582 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cynthia Weekes. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2572 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Karen L. Mulligan. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2571 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Judith M.K. March. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2570 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Leslie C. Gregg. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2569 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stacey Wilkins. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2568 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Deborah Lynn Rose. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2567 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert M. Cafaro. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2566 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dainia Simonelli. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2550 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cyndi Zacks. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2549 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robin Lipscomb. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2548 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Neil Ziegler. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2547 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nicole Williams. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2546 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa Stratton. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2545 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ted Nite. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2544 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julio Antonio Cotto Cruz. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2543 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Judy San Roman. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2542 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Angel Goytia. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2541 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard E. Gower. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2540 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Luis A Rivera Iglesias. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2539 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Vincent Ionata. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2538 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard Stein. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2537 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tina Price. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2536 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Danna Dunn. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2535 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dorine Wathington. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2534 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer McMillen. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2533 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Martin OMalley. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2532 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Monica OFlaherty. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2531 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Courtney Hand. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2530 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Janet French. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2529 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Hyatt. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2528 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tammy Simpson. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2527 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ronald M. Alexis. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2526 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Pamela McCarter. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2525 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julie Loesel. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2524 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Roaul Gandy. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2523 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Raymond Macareno. (ab)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2522 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gisselle Marie Lopez-Robles.(tro)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2521 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Puja Patel.(tro)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2520 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brandon K. Allen.(tro)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2519 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Theodore James Werkeiser, II.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2638 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laura Warren.(ama)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2637 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Randall Shearer.(ama)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2614 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Shawn Brooks.(ama)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2518 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Timothy Cascino.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2517 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Miguel Berdiel Roman.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2516 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Harris.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2515 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lauren Eden Lavin.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2514 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jo Ann Henry.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2513 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joslyn Spain.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2512 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Annette Carole Holtzleiter.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2511 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Troy Edward Roane.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2510 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ingrid Maassen.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2509 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Nolen Grogan, Jr.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2508 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Obioma Nkwuo.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2507 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Shannon O'Connell.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2506 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jacquelyn Hayes. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2505 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristy Finlayson. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2504 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Thomas Reinhardt. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2503 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Patterson. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2502 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristine Caruso. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2501 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Amburgy. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2500 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Konnie Binno. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2499 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Portia E. Lott. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2498 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Daniel Leslie. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2497 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Todd A. Blackwelder. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2496 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kent Hairston, II. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2495 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sandra Matijevic. (ab)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2427 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Krzysztof Cieslik.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2426 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephen Alexander Kuss.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2425 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ronald M. Alexis.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2424 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jacqueline Woods.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2423 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Maria Elena Sanchez.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2422 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Komrosky.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2421 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jackson Choy.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2420 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Larry Tomich.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2419 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Curtis L. Smith.(tro)
April 19, 2011 Filing 2418 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Seivers.(tro)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2643 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Mowry.(ama)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2642 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Thomas Moon.(ama)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2641 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bryan Thornburg.(ama)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2639 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lois Lee.(ama)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2494 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Wells. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2493 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Karen B. Sliwinski. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2492 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin D. Grayson. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2491 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kathleen Lawrence. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2490 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laura Bissell. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2489 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Theresa Esarey. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2488 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sara Wallace Underwood. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2487 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amanda M. Sinclair. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2486 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Terri L. Begun. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2485 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ted Nite. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2484 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brynton G. Goynes. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2483 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sherry Depinto. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2482 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Krista Phillips. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2481 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Thomas Sokol. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2480 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laura Klinestiver. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2479 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristin Buchanan. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2478 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kimberly Arouth. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2477 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Roblyer. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2476 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jacquelyn B. Kennedy. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2475 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tammy A. Wooten. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2474 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert A. Parker, Jr. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2473 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa M. Orifici. (ab)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2472 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin Powell. (ab)
April 17, 2011 Filing 2471 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert Barlow. (ab)
April 17, 2011 Filing 2470 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Zenovia White-Andrews. (ab)
April 17, 2011 Filing 2469 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Leslie Miller. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2468 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert Scott Smith. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2467 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Timothy Hinspeter. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2466 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Everett H. Meadows. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2465 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Danny Klone. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2464 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Karen K. Kirkman. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2463 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Woodward. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2462 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James T. Sprinkle. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2461 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Georgina Lahoud. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2460 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin L. Robertson. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2459 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Larry G. Miller, Jr. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2458 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christine A. Kradjian. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2457 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John J. Vasquez. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2456 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Greg Iannuccilli. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2455 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Craig M. Monroe. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2454 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert L. Allen, Jr. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2453 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa L. Brown. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2452 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mary Ann Soran. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2451 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joseph M. DeMattia. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2450 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Vetter. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2449 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stacy Bruner. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2448 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jamie Graziano. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2447 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rachel Sedor. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2446 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Krista Radojevich. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2445 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nicole Blair. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2444 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Luis Pinzon. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2443 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jodi Herzog. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2442 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Margaret Buran. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2441 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by George Watson. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2439 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John M. Saucier. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2438 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert Vialpando. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2437 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jeffrey Knicely. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2436 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Chirstopher Minton. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2435 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bartlette Dewitt. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2434 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kimberly Hill. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2433 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susi Wiseman. (ab)
April 15, 2011 Filing 2357 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.(Gost, Kimberly)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2440 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin Powell. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2432 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Charles Lee Bro. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2431 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brandi Cather. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2430 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Riordan. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2429 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Levine. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2428 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Andrew L. Wylie. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2417 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William R. Bowman, Jr. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2415 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Eric W. Munson. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2414 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by P.W. G. Hughes. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2413 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kelley Faust. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2412 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Clinton Scott Norman. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2411 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Allen P. Krammers. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2410 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Hurst. (ab)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2409 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Angela Hesson.(tro)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2408 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Ferguson.(tro)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2407 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anne Marie Leighton.(tro)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2406 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cameron Kip Young.(tro)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2405 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susan K. Ball.(tro)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2404 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bonnie Richardson.(tro)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2403 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Fidler.(tro)
April 14, 2011 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 2371 Letter, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (tro)
April 14, 2011 Filing 2371 Letter addressed to The Clerk of Court from Angela Rekowski dated 4/7/2011 re: Plaintiff previously completed and sent the consent form to participate with this litigation but would like to opt out in further proceedings in this case. *Staff Note: Accepted for filing by the Honorable James C. Francis on 4/18/2011. Plaintiff and entry 824 to be removed and Clerk of Court is to notify counsel of opt-out.* (tro) Modified on 4/20/2011 (tro).
April 13, 2011 Filing 2402 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Meyer.(tro)
April 13, 2011 Filing 2401 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa Ann Spotti.(tro)
April 13, 2011 Filing 2400 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Janell Karitmoto.(tro)
April 13, 2011 Filing 2399 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Sidney.(tro)
April 13, 2011 Filing 2398 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kirk C. O'Connell.(tro)
April 13, 2011 Filing 2397 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Chris B. Anderson.(tro)
April 13, 2011 Filing 2396 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Judy San Roman.(tro)
April 13, 2011 Filing 2395 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bess Blackburn.(tro)
April 13, 2011 Filing 2394 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christina Endicott.(tro)
April 13, 2011 Filing 2393 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sandra Louis.(tro)
April 13, 2011 Filing 2391 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Yamma Williams.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2390 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ashley Swalling.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2389 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tara Cafaro.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2388 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christine Powers.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2387 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Donald Dooley.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2386 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Diane Cummings.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2385 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ralph Ciccarelli Jr.(tro) Modified on 4/22/2011 (tro).
April 12, 2011 Filing 2384 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Vaughn Schouten.(tro) Modified on 4/22/2011 (tro).
April 12, 2011 Filing 2383 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dawn Spengler.(tro) Modified on 4/22/2011 (tro).
April 12, 2011 Filing 2382 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Danielle Douglas.(tro) Modified on 4/22/2011 (tro).
April 12, 2011 Filing 2381 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rhonda Ripley.(tro) Modified on 4/22/2011 (tro).
April 12, 2011 Filing 2380 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Seth Peare.(tro) Modified on 4/22/2011 (tro).
April 12, 2011 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 2372 Consent to become Party Plaintiff, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2372 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jane C. Pietrazak. *Staff note: Accepted for filing by the Honorable James C. Francis on 4/18/2011. Clerk of Court to notify counsel of this acceptance of filing. (tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2356 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephanie Van Belzen.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2355 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bina Patel.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2353 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Teresa Leonardo.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2352 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jon Colby Miller.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2351 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bartlette Dewitt.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2350 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michelle M. Rayfield.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2349 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scott Hanlon.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2348 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marc Anish.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2347 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jessica Baillargeon.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2346 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James O. Benton, Jr.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2345 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amy Wilson.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2344 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Delance V. Kinslow.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2343 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christine C. Dunn.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2342 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Shea.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2341 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Korie Ebmeyer.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2340 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Paula Benson Clements.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2339 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard M. Klotz, Jr.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2338 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Frank J. Vidal.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2337 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Croft.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2336 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amal Salameh.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2335 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brenda Gerdes.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2334 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Chip Tyler Shield.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2333 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mary Catherine Tartara.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2332 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Daniel H. Lee.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2331 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jaime Garza.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2330 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ralph B. Collins, Jr.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2329 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Barbara Vilches-Cruz.(tro)
April 12, 2011 Filing 2328 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Monica Turner.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2379 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Morant.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2378 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cynthia Truman.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2377 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Valerie Elser-Stone.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2376 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark Hammons.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2375 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Donald Fischer.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2374 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Erin Niemeyer.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2370 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin Strange.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2369 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Beau Bronder.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2368 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kenneth Kostelac.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2367 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tamika Alexander.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2354 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Meghan Lowry.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2327 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scot McClara.(tro)
April 11, 2011 Filing 2326 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Myra L. Crutchfield.(tro)
April 10, 2011 Filing 2366 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James Strum.(tro)
April 10, 2011 Filing 2365 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christie Woodman.(tro)
April 10, 2011 Filing 2364 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brandon Brown.(tro)
April 10, 2011 Filing 2363 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Calencia Fuqua.(tro)
April 10, 2011 Filing 2362 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Razia Qureshi.(tro)
April 10, 2011 Filing 2361 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amy Sannes.(tro)
April 10, 2011 Filing 2360 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Yvonne C. Kenney.(tro)
April 9, 2011 Filing 2359 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Charles P. Murray.(tro)
April 8, 2011 Filing 2325 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Leslie Moeini.(ama)
April 8, 2011 Filing 2324 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Daryl Boothe.(ama)
April 8, 2011 Filing 2323 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Darryl Plimpton.(ama)
April 8, 2011 Filing 2322 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ann Walsh.(ama)
April 8, 2011 Filing 2321 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Matthew Henninger.(ama)
April 8, 2011 Filing 2320 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anne Keepers.(ama)
April 8, 2011 Filing 2319 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Patrick McLaughlin.(ama)
April 8, 2011 Filing 2199 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark Nordeen.(tro)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2318 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Judy San Roman.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2317 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Karrie Thomas.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2316 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Naomi Boinus-Reehorst.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2315 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Aaron Weiss.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2314 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Wayne A. Nevills.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2313 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Timothy Cascino.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2312 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sandra Louis.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2311 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nazy Raygani.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2310 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alexandra Kulick.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2309 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Pamela S. Watson.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2308 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Allen Haight.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2307 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Danielle Surrey.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2306 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James Davidson.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2305 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Janelle Meyer.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2304 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Paula Clements.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2303 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Vanessa Dew.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2302 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark Ellis.(ama)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2301 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Daniel B. White.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2300 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joy Leek.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2299 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kyle Brunen.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2298 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jessica Cole.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2297 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Clay Stark.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2296 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dana Loriaux.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2295 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Luke Brown.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2294 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Beatrice Hernandez.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2293 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sonya Dodson.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2292 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James Jedow.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2291 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Goodson.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2290 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Wade Mount.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2289 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Taylor Morris.(ama)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2288 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Seema Gulati.(ama)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2287 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Roy A. Bouwmeester.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2283 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jill Smith.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2280 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Franklin Daleo.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2279 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gary Robles.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2278 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Buckley.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2277 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julie J. Dorsch.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2276 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carrie Sheppard.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2275 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kelly Roberson.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2274 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tina Thompson.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2273 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Theresa Solari.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2272 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephan G. Schickling.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2271 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Megan Manton.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2270 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark Palace.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2269 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa Smith.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2268 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michelle Guillaume.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2267 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mitchell Alberto.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2266 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kelly Hannah.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2265 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Andrea Maurer.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2264 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Hurst.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2263 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carolyn Y. Gray.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2262 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ryan Aleya.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2261 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lisa Maupin.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2260 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Payman Ostovapour.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2259 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alison Sawyer.(tro)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2258 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ingrid Maassen.(tro)
April 1, 2011 Filing 2257 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Battle Witherington.(tro)
April 1, 2011 Filing 2147 FIRST CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT amending #2 Amended Complaint, against Pfizer, Inc with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by P. Nelida Abdelnour, John Abdoo, Lisa Abraham, Michael Abraham, Hillary J. Abrams, Anthony Accardi, Scott J. Aceto, Tricia Acosta, Lynsey Adame, Brian Douglas Adams, Darren R Adams, Robert Adams, Shirley Adams, Timothy W Adams, James Addis, Toba Adina-Jao, Jerome O. Adkins, Shannon Adkins, Richard C. Adrian, Robert Agranov, John Aguero, Thomas M Ahif Jr., Donnell L.W. Akins, Benaias Albarran, Steven Alberti, Tracie Alch, James Alexander, Jody Alexander, Carrie Alfieri, Leyla Ali, Cameron Allan, Alisa Allen, Charles I Allen, Michael Allen, Robert Allen, Scott Allen, Terri Allen, Amy Alley, Joshua Alley, Colin Alleyne, Darlene J. Allison, Jane Allums, Jose Almaraz, Ardena Alston, Jose Amador, William Amato, Matthew Amberg, Elizabeth Amici, Monica Ammerman, Lara Amoroso, Courtney Amos, Adrianne Anderson, Douglas Anderson, Jeanette Anderson, Lisa Anderson, Mary Anderson, Scott E. Anderson, Yuette A Anderson, Travis Andre, Bourgoyne Andree, Rosalind Andry, Anthony Andujar, John S Anecharico, Robert Angie, Jr, Marc Anish, David Anthony, Joan Arabie, Amy Armstrong, CarrieAnn Arnold, Kimberly Arnold, Stephanie Arnold, Eric Aroca, Kimberly Arouth, M. Jay Arthur, Cynthia M. Atkins, James B Atwater, Mark D Auckner, Pamela Austin, Tracey Avert, Molly Axline, Amy Ayers, Peter Azzaretti, Brian Bachelder, John Bachman, Cory Baer, Karen I Baglama, Roy Baiamonte, Elizabeth Bailey, Jessica Bailey, Rebecca Bailey, Jessica Baillargeon, Renis Thurston Baker, Richard W Bakerp, Carol Balabushka, Lois Balala, Freddie Balanay, Staci Balanay, Mark Baldari, Juan Jesus Baldivia, Sandra Baldonado, Raelene Balidoy, Kimberly Ballentine, Robert Banez, Melissa Bankes, Nathan M Banks, Deryll Banning, Stacy T. Barbara, Kyla Barber, John Barcelona, Delrek Barge, Yolanda Barham, Mariah Barker, Veronica M Barker, Thomas Barklage, Catherine Barnard, Nicole Barnes, James Barnett, Tracey Barnett, Kristen Barr, Bernadette Barsch, David Bartell, Michael Bartholomew, Alan Bartlett, Gail Denise Bash, Cristina Basquez, Jennifer Bass, Steven Bath, Sonja Bauer, Michelle Baumer, Norman Baumgardner, Holly Baynes, Brian Beach, Theron Bean, Daniel Beany, Mark A. Beauchamp, Duy Beck, Denise Ann Becker, Nathan Beckett, Dave Beecham, Coleman Bell, Tressa Bell, Tyrone W. Bell, Brion K. Beller, Noah Beller, Katherine Belles, James J Bellush, Robert Benn, Joseph Bennett, Madeleine Benthin, Claudia Beqaj, Andrew T. Berkowitz, Alan Berlow, Carl Berry, Christine Berry, Christina Besemann, Aaron D. Bessonette, Fred Betzold, Rob Bickett, Jennifer Bielecki, Amelia Bigelow, Edward Binderup, Stacy Binyon, Nicole Bir, Helen L Birch, Bruce Bischoff, Gene Bittel, Jon Black, Todd A Blackwelder, Ann Morris Blah, David Blair, Tanisha Blake, Maria Lizette Blandon-Bisbal, John Bledsoe, Jodie Blindauer, Kimberly Blohowiak, Alton J. Blunschi, Amanda Charmane Boal, Brian Boatman, Roberts R Bobby, Ruel Bobet, Meredith Bochim, Joseph F Bogdan, Chris Bogle, Naomi Boinus-reehorst, Liesl Bold, Timothy J. Boldt, Trent R Bolesky, Shannon Bolton, Tyrun Bond, Loy Booker, Kelly Boon, Daryl Boothe, Deborah Borden, Amy Borgerding, Tiffiny Boschee, Andy Boseck, Dennis Boston, David Bottario, Alexis Bouhoutsos, Bethany Boulter, Shawn D. Bowers, Jeffrey Bowles, Abby Bowlin, Christian Boyce, William Boyce, Kristi Boyd, Leslie Boyd, Kenneth S Boyer, John Boyle, Conor Bradley, William Bradshaw, Tina Brady, Tabatha Brantley, Dusty Brasfield, Christopher Brattelli, Matthew Brauns, Robert Breakiron, Dustin Bredthauer, Elizabeth Bredy Clark, Matt Bremehr, Gregory Brenner, Jennifer Bresler, Theresa Brice, Lee Bridges, Ron Brigel, Kristen Briggs, Paula Bright, Rosalyn Bright-Bell, Norman Briones, Natalie Britt, Amie Brockway, Seth Brodsky, Elizabeth Brody, Lisa Bromfield, Jay Bronder, Cara Brooks, Henna Brooks, Herbert L Brooks, Lisa Brooks, Susanne Brooks, Timothy Brosnihan, Anne Marie Brostowitz, Jeff Brouwer, Deborah Brower, Chris Brown, Craig Brown, Delores Brown, Frank Brown, Jacqueline Brown, Jason Brown, Lauren Brown, Marcus Brown, Paul Brown, Ryan Brown, Mark Browning, Jeffrey Brownley, Jonathan Brucato, Mark Bruckner, Rose M Bruckner, Stephen Brudzewski, Jason Brumm, Sabrina Brunson, Andrew Bruone, Heather Bryan, Christopher Brynczka, Tina Buccola, Kathryn Buch, Olga Buchanan, Scarlet Buchanan, Loretta Budd, Brent L Buehler, Jeffrey G Buehrle, Marcus Buffaloe, Gordon Stewart Bunch, Jeremy Bunch, Kristine Bunch, Nicole C Bur, Jay Burch, Dwight Burgess, David M Burick, Michelle Burke, Haydiee P Burkes, Richard Burnett, Cheron Burns, Angela M Burnside, Jamie Burrell, James G Burroughs, Scott Burrows, Denise Burt, Robert Butlowski, Eric Bylan, David Byrd, Edward Byrd, Jace D Cabezut, Leann Cable, Herminio Cabrera, Kay Caccamo, Angela Cacciatore McLaughlin, Latroy Caesar, Jennifer Cafferelli, Suzanne M Calabro, Dustin Caldwell, Buck Calfy, Ashley Calhoun, John Callahan, Pamela Callahan, Catherine Calloway, Anthony Calo, Marnee Camp, Yvonne Camp, Kelsey Canady, Tamara Cannon, Matthew Capobianco, James Cardillo, Jody Carkhuff, Nancy Carlino, Michael Wayne Carlo, Eric Carlson, Michelle Carlson, John W Carlton, John Carney, Marie Carolan, David P Carothers, Sandra Carovano, Lisa Marie Carpenter, Christopher Carr, Tania Carrell, Frank Carrico, Matthew Carroll, Lisa Carson, Kristine Caruso, Timothy Cascino, Mark P. Casey, William Cassell, Lydia Gies Castagna, Miozoty Castillo, Kenyon Catchings, Dianna Cavalier, Matt Cavalier, Sheila Cawmon, Sara Cecchini, Robert Cella, Jasen Chadwick, Ricky Chahal, Timothy Chain, Robert Chall, Olga E. Chama, Tracey Mason Chamberlin, Andrew Chambers, Elizabeth K Chambers, Donovan Chance, Pavan Chandra, Thomas Chang, Douglas Chapman, Gabriel Chapman, Matthew Chapman, Cathy Charbonnet, Alan Chase, George Chavez, Jabbar Cheathem, Robert Chenault, Jonathan Cheney, Bonnie Cheung, Elizabeth Childers, Aaron Chipley, Sherry Choate, Archana Chokshi, Raymond C. Chop, Matthew Christopherson, Alane M. Cicchitto, Carolyn Cho Clahan, Dorinda D. Clark, Joseph Clark, Larissa Clark, Reid Clark, Theresa Michelle Clark, Treehern Clark, Larry Clay, Dawn Clemence, Antonio Clements, Brigid Clevenger, Jennifer Clifton, Thomas Albert Clobes, Nicole Cochran, Michael Cody, Mary Coffon, Greg Cohen, Jade Cohen, Mindy J Cohen, Angela Cohenp, Paige Coker, Kathleen Colarusso, Robin Cole, Traci Cole, Christina Coleman, Robert Coleman, Trace G. Collier, Zachary Collier, Patrick J. Colligon, Cecil Collins, Robert Colontrelle, Alexandra Colvin, Richard Combs, James Conklin, Patricia A Connell, Laurie Conner, Marsha Connor, Michelle Cook, Bill Coolidge, Susan Cooney-Ghirsig, Christina S. Cooper, Stanley Cooper, Christina Copeland, Pamela Copus, Melissa M Corcoran, Jason R Cordova, C Cordray, Jayson Ryan Cormier, Kara Cornacchio, Heather Cornwell, Diana Corry, Laura Corwin, Nick Costa, Richard Costello, Nathan Cote, Leslie Cotte, Wayne Coulter, Anthony Coultrip, Jan Courtney, Maria Coutee, Todd A. Coverdale, Lenora Covington, Christopher Cox, Karen A. Cox, Robert Cox, Patrice Craig, Joseph Crandall, Davaree Crawford, Scott T. Crawford, Marion Creighton, Dana Creller, Justin Crockett, John R. Croft, Brendan Crooker, Susan Cross, Tegan Crouch, Shane Crowell, Anne B. Crump, Pamela Cubelic, Christian Culver, Thomas K. Cumm, Joseph Stephen Curoe, John Curran, Grant Cussans, Amy Cyman, Claudia D'Larotta, Angela Dabney, Dan J. Dagerman, Courtney Daglish, Jeffrey Dahms, Donald Daily, Yehia Dajani, David E Dale, Jennifer Damm, Fred Damuth, James Dane, Amir Daneshvar, Kristen Daniel, Kalpana Daniel, Isabel Daniels, Monica Daniely, Theodore Danzer, Jennifer Dardis, Tori Dargati, Christopher Darling, Sanjeev Datta, Melissa Davidian, Heather L Davidson, Jennifer Davidson, Kenneth Davidson, Amy Davis, Conrad Davis, Derrick Davis, Dustin M. Davis, Elizabeth Davis, Erica Davis, Grady S Davis, Gregory K Davis, John Davis, Kristy Davis, Scott Davis, Tykisha Davis, Elizabeth Davtian, Todd Dawson, Shanti Daya, James De Anda, Keith DeAgostine, Richard DeBellis, Brian J. DeCoud, Jill DeFord, Shawn DeFord, Brandye DeLarge, Julian C DeLehman, Nikki DeMaine, Albert DeRenzo, Shawn Dean, Jessica Debenedetto, Pamela Dedes, Gary Defulvio, Ricardo Delange, Andrea Delfiner, Drew Dellenbach, John Dellinger, Robert Deluca, John Deming, Glenn Demott, Julie Demro, Marguerite Denham, Tara Denney, David Depto, Joseph Dering, Brian Derrico, Sara Deshotel, Anjela Deshpande, Dave Devanshu, Thomas W Devich, Bartlette Dewitt, Elizabeth Dewitz, Gary Michael DiBacco, Gary M DiBacco, Richard B DiBenedetto, Maria D. DiRenzo, Tom Diab, Firas R Dib, Kassem Dickens, Ashley Diep, Faith Dimuzio, Danielle Dinardo, Dashawn Dingle, Toan Do, Kristy Dobrauc, Dean Dochterman, Lori L. Dodd, Almon Donnelly, Todd Dooley, Winston F Dorian, Kristen Dorick, Joseph M Dougherty, Margaret Dougherty, Monica Dove, Peggy Downes, Kathryn Downey, Karen Downve, Shari Draper, Kristen Drenocky, Marci Drimer, Thomas Driscoll, Kimberly Driver, Nelton Dsouza, Alexander Duarte, Elvys Duarte, Blake Duckworth, Karen Duffy, Gina Duggan, Juliana Dukes, Daniel Dull, Ernest Duncan, Hareld Ray Duncan, Lori Dupaul, Sheri Durham, Ashley Dwight, Gentry Easley, David East, Toby Eastland, Christopher Ecke, Cheryl Eddow, Betsy Eddy, Kelly Edelman, Leslie Eden, Kenneth L Egans, Jeffrey Eglow, Anne Eichengreen, Deborah Eisenberg, Eric Eisenberg, Meghan Eisnaugle, Walter Ejnes, Carl Ekman, David Elder, Maria Ely, Lawrence Endacott, Molly Engelhard, Lauren English, Veronica English, Keith Enloe, Cheryl Ennen, Lindsay Eppes, Jacquelyn Epstein, Geoff Ernst, Lia Ervans, Mark Eskander, Amy Angie Esposito, Mollie A Esposito, Marshall Estelle, David Esterly, Rolando Estrugo, George Evancho, Sonia Evangelista, Bradford Evans, Deirdre Evavold, David Ewing, Carolyn Extine, Donna McDaniel Facello, Paul C Fadool, Brian Failla, Karrie Faiman, Joseph Falk, David Farber, Maureen Farley, Christopher Farrell, Patrick Farrell, Louvel Fauntroy, Lora Faust, Alexander Fava, Jessica Feele, Elizabeth Fehr, Mindy S Feld, William Fell, Scott Feltrinelli, Adanna Ferguson, Dennis Bartholomew Ferguson, Andres Fernandez, Cory Fernandez, Jennifer Fernandez,
April 1, 2011 Filing 2145 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Kimberly J. Gost dated 3/29/2011 re: In Response to Plaintiffs' letter to the Court dated 3/28/2011 seeking the Court's imprimatur to send "reminder" postcards to putative class members who have not opted-in to this action. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.(mbe)
April 1, 2011 Filing 2144 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Samuel Shapiro dated 3/28/2011 re: We write to seek the Court's imprimatur to mail reminder postcards to potential opt-in plaintiffs who have not yet filed a Consent to Join Form. Filed by all plaintiffs.(mbe)
April 1, 2011 Filing 2133 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jaspreet Rai.(mbe)
April 1, 2011 Filing 2132 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jasen Chadwick.(mbe)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2185 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carlos Trujillp.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2184 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Peter Magi.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2183 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scott Stivers.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2182 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Raymond Padmore.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2181 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nicole Doyle.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2180 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tanya Ramos.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2179 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Janine Abisch.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2178 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Monica Jones.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2177 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Stephen Sullivan.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2176 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Maria Del Carmen Navarro.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2175 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Larry D. Kneppa.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2174 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lori Stewart.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2173 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jonathan Lemery.(tro)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2103 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Samuel Shapiro dated 3/30/2011 re: Requesting that the Court grant permission to mail the attached postcard to potential opt-in plaintiffs who have not submitted a Consent to Joint form. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted with respect to a postcard reminder in the form attached to this letter. The revised form removes any suggestion of coercion or influence by the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/31/2011) (jpo)
March 30, 2011 Filing 2191 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James Leo.(tro)
March 30, 2011 Filing 2190 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Baruka.(tro)
March 30, 2011 Filing 2189 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dierde Ryan Makatche.(tro)
March 30, 2011 Filing 2188 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Margaret Reilly.(tro)
March 30, 2011 Filing 2187 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lisa Pisicchio.(tro)
March 30, 2011 Filing 2186 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nary Inn Dolan.(tro)
March 29, 2011 Filing 2172 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Filed by Michelle Abbani.(tro)
March 29, 2011 Filing 2171 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Renee Stefanko.(tro)
March 29, 2011 Filing 2170 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Eileen Martinez-Eaddy.(tro)
March 29, 2011 Filing 2169 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Delance V. Kinslow.(tro)
March 28, 2011 Filing 2168 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristine S. Lanphere.(tro)
March 28, 2011 Filing 2167 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scott Thompson.(tro)
March 28, 2011 Filing 2166 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brooke Albright.(tro)
March 28, 2011 Filing 2083 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Travis Roseboro.(jmi)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2286 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Karl Carlson.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2285 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scott Aceto.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2284 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Aaron Kramer.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2282 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Hill Brown.(tro) Modified on 4/14/2011 (tro).
March 27, 2011 Filing 2281 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tracy Olson.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2256 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by James Little.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2255 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Calderin-Ludwig.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2254 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jamie Manna.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2253 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Garland.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2252 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tatanisha McQueen.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2251 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Teresa Leonardo.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2250 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Steven Fowler.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2249 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Martin OMalley.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2248 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephanie Gifford.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2247 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kathy Lunsford.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2246 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Aaron Thompson.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2245 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stanley Johnson.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2244 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Craig Sampsel.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2243 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristi Watson.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2242 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amanda Harry.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2241 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brynton Goynes.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2198 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christina Glaster.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2197 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kimberly Keller.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2196 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Leslie Treadaway.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2193 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ann Anderson.(tro)
March 27, 2011 Filing 2192 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Danielle Kutner.(tro)
March 25, 2011 Filing 2165 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joseph M. DeMattia.(tro)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2069 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from William J. Simmons dated 3/23/11 re: The parties request that the Court order that any consent forms containing obscene language or drawings, as determined by the reasonable judgment of Mr. D'Agostino (Docket Services Manager) or his designee, including the two forms already brought to the parties' attention by Mr. D'Agostino, should be filed under seal with only the Court and the parties having access to such forms. The parties request that in the event that any additional opt-in forms are submitted to the Court containing obscene drawings or language, Mr. D'Agostino or his designee contact the parties to inform them of the development and afford them the chance to review the new forms that their convenience. At the end of the Court's designated opt-in period, the parties propose that they will review all such forms filed under seal and, should either party disagree with the sealing of any of the forms, that party will write a letter to the Court, attaching the consent form or forms that it contends should no longer be kept under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/24/2011) (mro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2240 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Vicki Smith.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2239 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rodney Lowry.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2238 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Logan.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2237 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Megan E. Pappas.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2236 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dominick Menotti.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2235 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dyan Thompson.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2234 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bernadette DePillo.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2233 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Pamela Valdez.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2232 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Little Laura McNeil.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2231 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Daniel Bitter.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2230 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marilyn Samuelson.(tro)
March 24, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2011. (tro)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2070 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (655) Motion to Amend/Correct; granting (655) Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:06-cv-9952-JCF (as Lead Case) with 1:06-cv-15200, 1:07-cv-4532 in case 1:06-cv-09952-JCF. For the reasons set forth in this Order, the plaintiffs' motion to consolidate these actions and for leave to file an amended consolidated complaint is granted. Accordingly, the actions shall be consolidated under case number 06 Civ. 9952. The plaintiffs shall file their consolidated amended complaint by 4/1/2011, and the defendant shall file its answer by 4/15/2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/24/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-09952-JCF, 1:06-cv-15200-JCF, 1:07-cv-04532-JCF Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro) (Main Document 2070 replaced on 3/25/2011) (tro).
March 24, 2011 Filing 2068 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Allison McAdoo.(mro)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2067 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robin Cole.(mro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2358 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joseph Schurtz.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2229 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Virgil Solomon.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2228 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anastasia Turano.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2227 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sylvie Roberge.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2226 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Victor Hudson.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2225 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Debra Haley.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2224 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by AnnaMaria Rotella.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2223 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dominique Atkins.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2222 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Debra McAllister.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2221 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Heidi Ziegler.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2220 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mildred Crawford.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2219 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Howard T. Ferguson.(tro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2218 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Draggett.(tro) Modified on 4/11/2011 (tro).
March 21, 2011 Filing 2217 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin Johnson.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2216 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jessica Williamson.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2215 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anthony Woodson.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2214 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sherry D. Baker.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2213 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert Davis.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2212 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Harris.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2211 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Berna Blake.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2210 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christopher Humpert.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2209 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brett Campbell.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2208 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lisa G. Davis.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2207 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Daniels.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2206 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jonathan Lauzon.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2205 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Heather Dennis.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2204 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nazy Raygani.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2203 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Carstens.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2202 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Latrice Morrison.(tro) Modified on 4/11/2011 (tro).
March 21, 2011 Filing 2201 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susan Lauder.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2200 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lauren Dunlap.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2164 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susan K. Ball.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2163 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Andrew Napolitano.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2162 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Barbara Burnette.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2161 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Ferguson.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2160 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gerald Burgeson.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2159 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brad Yapo.(tro)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2158 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Charles Carey.(tro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2066 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kimberly Nichols.(mro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2065 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christopher Medlar.(mro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2064 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tracey Hawkins.(mro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2063 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Todd A Blackwelder.(mro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2062 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ardena Alston.(mro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2061 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cristina Basquez.(mro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2060 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sara Cecchini.(mro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2059 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carly Lambert.(mro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2058 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elvys Duarte.(mro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 1969 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Angela Cacciatore McLaughlin.(mro)
March 18, 2011 Filing 1967 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christian Boyce.(mro)
March 17, 2011 Filing 1963 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cliff Lemmerhirt.(mbe)
March 17, 2011 Filing 1951 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Greta Nowak.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 2009 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Todd Dawson.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1966 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Fell.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1965 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Glenn Wells.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1964 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Andrea Lyons.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1962 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Janelle Hyland.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1961 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Herminio Cabrera.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1960 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kirk Wald.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1959 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laura Corwin.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1958 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kandy Magnotti.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1957 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by L Dawn Tittsworth.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1956 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Maraya Magness.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1955 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Reid Clark.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1954 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kimberly Arouth.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1953 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susan Rattner.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1952 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christopher Brattelli.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1950 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kathryn O'Brien.(mro)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1949 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lisa Abraham.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2156 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Loring.(tro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2008 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Markowitz.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2007 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dustin M. Davis.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2006 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Gedraitis.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2005 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Abby Bowlin.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2004 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alton Watts.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2003 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jonathan Katchmore.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2002 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brandye DeLarge.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2001 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jodi Lindstrom.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2000 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Davis.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1998 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lindsey Patton.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1997 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ronald Valdez.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1995 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Giffin.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1993 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Frank Rivers.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1990 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carmelo Padro.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1988 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Clinton Norman.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1986 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Goins.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1984 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Courtney Amos.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1982 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jonathan Pacquing.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1980 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kinda Stroud.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1978 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Arlen Zepeda.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1976 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Raul Jaquez.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1974 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Angela Frye.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1947 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gary W. Scott.(mro)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1946 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert Kuhter.(mro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2157 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joni Pentifallo.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2155 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julie Harper.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2154 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Archer Yates.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2153 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jill Arcuri.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2152 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John M. Saucier.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2151 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Loring.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2150 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ksenia Mintchenko.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2149 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristine Dunbar.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2148 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joseph Bishop.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2146 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tim F. Strohm.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2143 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ashley Diep.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2142 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bruce Pennington.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2141 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Antonio Clements.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2140 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Margaret M. Patches.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2082 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jonathan Brucato.(tro)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2081 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joshua Riek.(tro) Modified on 3/28/2011 (tro).
March 14, 2011 Filing 1948 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Richard D. Lamb.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1885 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Fowler.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1884 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Quinn.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1882 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Clorris Sthole.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1880 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amy Serafino.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1878 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dwight Burgess.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1876 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nanette O'Brien.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1875 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gary Homsey.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1872 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Timonty Tribble.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1869 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Daryl Boothe.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1867 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brenda McCall.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1864 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nicole Kurz.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1862 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christopher Sulli.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1859 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laura Law.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1857 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kolleen Sulli.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1855 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alan Bartlett.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1853 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Regina Williams.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1851 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elise Wiseman.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1849 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Glenn Willoughby.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1847 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Earl Whetstone.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1845 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Coleman Bell.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1843 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jay Burch.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1841 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Giometti.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1840 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Clifton Williamson.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1838 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Erinn Denise Urquiaga.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1835 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Hadden.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1834 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jeffrey Hutchison.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1832 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christina Besemann.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1831 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Deborah Borden.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1830 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Margaret Morrison.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1829 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marc Morrison.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1828 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kendra Mesa.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1827 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Leon Keesee.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1826 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tracy Scafariello.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1825 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Deanine Mancini.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1824 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Maria Scott.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1823 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Karen Kirkman.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1822 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gail Gravell.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1821 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William Longfield.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1820 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Pema.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1819 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Timothy Chain.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1818 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Leslie Eden.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1817 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cameron Young.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1816 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Laila Shetty.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1815 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Griffiths.(mro)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1814 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ronald McDaniel.(mro)
March 10, 2011 Filing 1945 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scott J. Aceto.(mro)
March 10, 2011 Filing 1944 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sharon Piper.(mbe)
March 10, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #1531 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 02/22/2011, Receipt Number 930074. (jd)
March 9, 2011 Filing 1811 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Debra Paster.(mro)
March 9, 2011 Filing 1809 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Larkin.(mro)
March 8, 2011 Filing 1813 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Join Form. Document filed by James T. Shamp. (mro)
March 8, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis: Discovery Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2011. (mbe)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1807 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marc Anish.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1805 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kamilla Kazel.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1803 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jeffrey Kovalick.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1801 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Scearce.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1800 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Milton Guzman.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1799 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Susan Shaw-Anderson.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1798 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christine Shea.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1796 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christopher Hall.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1795 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Bailey.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1793 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Foedisch.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1792 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Loverme.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1791 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gabriella Hernandez.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1790 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alesia Jackson.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1789 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scott Hanlon.(mro)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1788 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Giglio.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1787 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Conrad Davis.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1786 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Alexandra Colvin.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1785 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Kriznik.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1784 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cristina Johnson.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1783 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gary Malin.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1782 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Brian Murray.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1781 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Maria Ely.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1780 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Trevor Winter.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1779 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marybeth Zane.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1778 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Frank Madden.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1777 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mary Frank.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1776 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Aida Palomo Ramirez.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1775 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jane Reaves.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1774 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christin Major.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1773 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Julieta Medlar.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1772 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Molly Axline.(mro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 1667 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam R Pulver on behalf of P. Nelida Abdelnour, John Abdoo, Michael Abraham, Hillary J. Abrams, Anthony Accardi, Tricia Acosta, Lynsey Adame, Darren R Adams, Robert Adams, Shirley Adams, Timothy W Adams, James Addis, Toba Adina-Jao, Jerome O. Adkins, Shannon Adkins, Robert Agranov, John Aguero, Thomas M Ahif Jr., Donnell L.W. Akins, Benaias Albarran, Steven Alberti, Tracie Alch, James Alexander, Jody Alexander, Carrie Alfieri, Leyla Ali, Cameron Allan, Alisa Allen, Charles I Allen, Michael Allen, Terri Allen, Amy Alley, Joshua Alley, Darlene J. Allison, Jane Allums, Jose Almaraz, Jose Amador, William Amato, Matthew Amberg, Elizabeth Amici, Monica Ammerman, Douglas Anderson, Jeanette Anderson, Mary Anderson, Scott E. Anderson, Yuette A Anderson, Bourgoyne Andree, Rosalind Andry, Anthony Andujar, John S Anecharico, Robert Angie, Jr, David Anthony, Joan Arabie, Amy Armstrong, Kimberly Arnold, Stephanie Arnold, Eric Aroca, M. Jay Arthur, Cynthia M. Atkins, James B Atwater, Mark D Auckner, Pamela Austin, Tracey Avert, Cory Baer, Karen I Baglama, Roy Baiamonte, Jessica Bailey, Rebecca Bailey, Renis Thurston Baker, Richard W Bakerp, Carol Balabushka, Lois Balala, Freddie Balanay, Juan Jesus Baldivia, Sandra Baldonado, Raelene Balidoy, Kimberly Ballentine, Robert Banez, Melissa Bankes, Nathan M Banks, Deryll Banning, Stacy T. Barbara, Kyla Barber, John Barcelona, Yolanda Barham, Mariah Barker, Veronica M Barker, Thomas Barklage, Catherine Barnard, James Barnett, Tracey Barnett, Bernadette Barsch, David Bartell, Gail Denise Bash, Jennifer Bass, Steven Bath, Sonja Bauer, Michelle Baumer, Holly Baynes, Brian Beach, Theron Bean, Daniel Beany, Mark A. Beauchamp, Duy Beck, Denise Ann Becker, Nathan Beckett, Dave Beecham, Tressa Bell, Tyrone W. Bell, Brion K. Beller, Noah Beller, Katherine Belles, James J Bellush, Joseph Bennett, Madeleine Benthin, Claudia Beqaj, Andrew T. Berkowitz, Alan Berlow, Aaron D. Bessonette, Fred Betzold, Rob Bickett, Jennifer Bielecki, Amelia Bigelow, Stacy Binyon, Nicole Bir, Helen L Birch, Bruce Bischoff, Jon Black, Ann Morris Blah, David Blair, Maria Lizette Blandon-Bisbal, John Bledsoe, Jodie Blindauer, Kimberly Blohowiak, Alton J. Blunschi, Amanda Charmane Boal, Brian Boatman, Meredith Bochim, Joseph F Bogdan, Chris Bogle, Naomi Boinus-reehorst, Liesl Bold, Timothy J. Boldt, Trent R Bolesky, Shannon Bolton, Tyrun Bond, Loy Booker, Kelly Boon, Amy Borgerding, Dennis Boston, David Bottario, Alexis Bouhoutsos, Shawn D. Bowers, Jeffrey Bowles, Christian Boyce, William Boyce, Kristi Boyd, Leslie Boyd, Kenneth S Boyer, Conor Bradley, William Bradshaw, Tabatha Brantley, Dusty Brasfield, Robert Breakiron, Dustin Bredthauer, Elizabeth Bredy Clark, Matt Bremehr, Gregory Brenner, Jennifer Bresler, Lee Bridges, Ron Brigel, Kristen Briggs, Paula Bright, Rosalyn Bright-Bell, Norman Briones, Amie Brockway, Seth Brodsky, Elizabeth Brody, Lisa Bromfield, Jay Bronder, Cara Brooks, Henna Brooks, Herbert L Brooks, Lisa Brooks, Susanne Brooks, Timothy Brosnihan, Anne Marie Brostowitz, Deborah Brower, Craig Brown, Frank Brown, Jacqueline Brown, Lauren Brown, Marcus Brown, Paul Brown, Ryan Brown, Mark Browning, Jeffrey Brownley, Mark Bruckner, Rose M Bruckner, Stephen Brudzewski, Jason Brumm, Sabrina Brunson, Andrew Bruone, Heather Bryan, Christopher Brynczka, Tina Buccola, Kathryn Buch, Olga Buchanan, Scarlet Buchanan, Loretta Budd, Brent L Buehler, Jeffrey G Buehrle, Marcus Buffaloe, Gordon Stewart Bunch, Jeremy Bunch, Kristine Bunch, Nicole C Bur, David M Burick, Michelle Burke, Haydiee P Burkes, Richard Burnett, Cheron Burns, Angela M Burnside, Jamie Burrell, James G Burroughs, Scott Burrows, Denise Burt, Robert Butlowski, Eric Bylan, David Byrd, Edward Byrd, Jace D Cabezut, Leann Cable, Kay Caccamo, Latroy Caesar, Jennifer Cafferelli, Suzanne M Calabro, Dustin Caldwell, Buck Calfy, Ashley Calhoun, John Callahan, Catherine Calloway, Anthony Calo, Yvonne Camp, Kelsey Canady, Matthew Capobianco, James Cardillo, Jody Carkhuff, Nancy Carlino, Michael Wayne Carlo, Eric Carlson, Michelle Carlson, John W Carlton, John Carney, Marie Carolan, David P Carothers, Lisa Marie Carpenter, Christopher Carr, Tania Carrell, Frank Carrico, Matthew Carroll, Lisa Carson, Timothy Cascino, Mark P. Casey, William Cassell, Lydia Gies Castagna, Miozoty Castillo, Kenyon Catchings, Dianna Cavalier, Matt Cavalier, Sheila Cawmon, Robert Cella, Robert Chall, Olga E. Chama, Tracey Mason Chamberlin, Andrew Chambers, Elizabeth K Chambers, Donovan Chance, Thomas Chang, Douglas Chapman, Matthew Chapman, Cathy Charbonnet, Alan Chase, Jabbar Cheathem, Robert Chenault, Marisa Cherry, Bonnie Cheung, Elizabeth Childers, Aaron Chipley, Sherry Choate, Archana Chokshi, Raymond C. Chop, Matthew Christopherson, Alane M. Cicchitto, Carolyn Cho Clahan, Dorinda D. Clark, Joseph Clark, Larissa Clark, Theresa Michelle Clark, Larry Clay, Brigid Clevenger, Jennifer Clifton, Thomas Albert Clobes, Michael Cody, Mary Coffon, Greg Cohen, Mindy J Cohen, Angela Cohenp, Paige Coker, Kathleen Colarusso, Traci Cole, Christina Coleman, Trace G. Collier, Patrick J. Colligon, Cecil Collins, Robert Colontrelle, Richard Combs, James Conklin, Patricia A Connell, Laurie Conner, Marsha Connor, Michelle Cook, Bill Coolidge, Susan Cooney-Ghirsig, Christina S. Cooper, Stanley Cooper, Christina Copeland, Pamela Copus, Melissa M Corcoran, Jason R Cordova, C Cordray, Jayson Ryan Cormier, Kara Cornacchio, Heather Cornwell, Diana Corry, Nick Costa, Leslie Cotte, Wayne Coulter, Anthony Coultrip, Jan Courtney, Maria Coutee, Todd A. Coverdale, Lenora Covington, Christopher Cox, Karen A. Cox, Robert Cox, Patrice Craig, Joseph Crandall, Davaree Crawford, Marion Creighton, Dana Creller, Justin Crockett, John R. Croft, Brendan Crooker, Susan Cross, Tegan Crouch, Shane Crowell, Anne B. Crump, Christian Culver, Thomas K. Cumm, Joseph Stephen Curoe, John Curran, Grant Cussans, Amy Cyman, Claudia D'Larotta, Angela Dabney, Dan J. Dagerman, Courtney Daglish, Jeffrey Dahms, Donald Daily, Yehia Dajani, David E Dale, Jennifer Damm, Fred Damuth, James Dane, Amir Daneshvar, Theodore Danzer, Jennifer Dardis, Tori Dargati, Sanjeev Datta, Melissa Davidian, Heather L Davidson, Jennifer Davidson, Amy Davis, Erica Davis, Grady S Davis, Gregory K Davis, John Davis, Kristy Davis, Scott Davis, Elizabeth Davtian, James De Anda, Keith DeAgostine, Richard DeBellis, Brian J. DeCoud, Jill DeFord, Shawn DeFord, Julian C DeLehman, Nikki DeMaine, Albert DeRenzo, Jessica Debenedetto, Pamela Dedes, Gary Defulvio, Andrea Delfiner, John Dellinger, Robert Deluca, John Deming, Glenn Demott, Julie Demro, Marguerite Denham, Tara Denney, David Depto, Joseph Dering, Brian Derrico, Sara Deshotel, Anjela Deshpande, Thomas W Devich, Elizabeth Dewitz, Gary Michael DiBacco, Gary M DiBacco, Richard B DiBenedetto, Maria D. DiRenzo, Firas R Dib, Kassem Dickens, Danielle Dinardo, Dashawn Dingle, Toan Do, Dean Dochterman, Lori L. Dodd, Almon Donnelly, Todd Dooley, Winston F Dorian, Kristen Dorick, Joseph M Dougherty, Margaret Dougherty, Monica Dove, Peggy Downes, Kathryn Downey, Karen Downve, Shari Draper, Kristen Drenocky, Marci Drimer, Thomas Driscoll, Kimberly Driver, Alexander Duarte, Blake Duckworth, Karen Duffy, Gina Duggan, Juliana Dukes, Daniel Dull, Hareld Ray Duncan, Lori Dupaul, Sheri Durham, Gentry Easley, David East, Toby Eastland, Christopher Ecke, Cheryl Eddow, Betsy Eddy, Kelly Edelman, Kenneth L Egans, Jeffrey Eglow, Anne Eichengreen, Deborah Eisenberg, Eric Eisenberg, Meghan Eisnaugle, Walter Ejnes, Carl Ekman, David Elder, Lawrence Endacott, Molly Engelhard, Lauren English, Veronica English, Cheryl Ennen, Lindsay Eppes, Jacquelyn Epstein, Geoff Ernst, Lia Ervans, Amy Angie Esposito, Mollie A Esposito, David Esterly, Rolando Estrugo, George Evancho, Sonia Evangelista, David Ewing, Carolyn Extine, Donna McDaniel Facello, Paul C Fadool, Brian Failla, Karrie Faiman, Joseph Falk, David Farber, Maureen Farley, Patrick Farrell, Louvel Fauntroy, Lora Faust, Alexander Fava, Jessica Feele, Elizabeth Fehr, Mindy S Feld, Adanna Ferguson, Dennis Bartholomew Ferguson, Andres Fernandez, Cory Fernandez, Jennifer Fernandez, Noe Fernandez, Michael Ferraro, Patricia Ferrier, Mark Ferris, Emily Filloramo, Shawn Fingerle, Kim Fingers, Rosanne Finley, David Finlinson, Margaret Finnerin, Adam Fiore, William Fircetz, Bryan Fisher, Stacy Fishman, John Fitch, R. Todd Fitch, Tonya Fitzgerald, David Fjelstul, Brooke N. Flagg, Johnny H Flakes III, Ashley Flamino, Bryan Fleischmann, Richard Fleming, Michelle L. Fleshman, Alisa Fliss, Tanya Florin, Deborah Forbes, Gaylon Foresee, Shea Forner, Chad Forrey, Craig Foster, Leslie Foster, Todd Foulks, Donald C. Fowler, Kevin Fowler, Andrew F Fox, Shelley Fox, Tonya Fox, Aaron Frank, John Frank, Charles H. Franklin, Sara Frechette, Robyn Freeman, Donna Freeze, Jessica French, Julie French, Marvalesha French, Nicole L Friday, Scott Friedel, Barry Friedman, Hollie Fritz, Meredith Frydman, Matt Fryxell, Cecilia E Fuentes, Maria C. Fuentes, Mildred Fuentes, Marc David Fujimoto, Amy Fullem, Sarah Fulton, Will Futch, Laura Gadowski, Joseph Gagliano, Biana Galis, Vanessa Galkin, John Gallagher, Emilio Gallego, Jamie Galloway, Joseph Gambino, Douglas Gantt, Janice Garahy, Baltasar Garaygordobil, Jonathan C Garcia, Shane T Garcia, Tracie L. Garcia, Christopher Gartland, Angela Gasser, Lance Gay, JoAnn L Gaydek, Chris A Geiger, Stefanie Gentile, Nicole Geoffrion, Matthew George, Carl Gerace, Kathryn Gerleman, Alison Geron, Johnnie Gevargesian, Ashley Ghattas, Gregg Ghottschling, Eric J Gianni, Kimberly Giles, Zachary Giles, Kevin Gill, Ryan Gillette, Susan C. Gillham, Brent Gilmore, Kelly Gilroy-Jackson, Jason Ginger, Cynthia Ellis Givens, Neely Glass, James Glawatz, Mark Goddard, Kelly Goertz, Susan Goett, Nikou Golchin, Todd M. Goldberg, Richard L. Goldman, Sheera Goldstrom, Debra Gonzales, Rhonda Gonzales, Lynn Goodell, Faye I Gordon, Nadine Gordon, Suzette L. Gordon, Irina Gorelik, Lindsay Gotto, Helen Gowanny, Agustin Gracia, Jr, Kim Ritchey Granger, Shannon Gray, Robert Greco, Angel Greely, Cynthia Green, Gay Green-Carden, Audra Greene, Bonnie Greenwood, John Greenwood, Lynette Grefrath, Patrick Griffin, Volney Duraine Griff
March 3, 2011 Filing 1771 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by George Chavez.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1770 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Roya Moshiri.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1769 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by CarrieAnn Arnold.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1768 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michelle Parry.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1767 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Bachman.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1765 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert Smith.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1764 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dawn Clemence.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1763 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Carrie Kent.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1762 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kevin Hill.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1761 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Fischer.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1760 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Natalie Britt.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1759 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Melissa Zumbach.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1758 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marcus E. Williams.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1757 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Heather N. Wood.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1718 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lovell Hooks.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1717 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sherri Neal.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1716 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gregg Salser.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1715 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jere Gerard.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1714 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristy Dobrauc.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1713 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rocco Wicks.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1712 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ricardo Delange.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1711 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by David Johnson.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1710 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Andrew Miller.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1709 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristen Barr.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1708 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jessica Goldfine.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1707 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael J. Walden.(mro)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1553 ORDER granting #1531 Motion for Nathan J. Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/2/2011) (js)
March 2, 2011 Filing 1706 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marshall Estelle.(mro)
March 2, 2011 Filing 1705 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Keith Enloe.(mro)
March 2, 2011 Filing 1704 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Nicole Cochran.(mro)
March 2, 2011 Filing 1703 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ricky Chahal.(mro)
March 2, 2011 Filing 1702 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bryan Edward Gary.(mro)
March 2, 2011 Filing 1701 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Thomas Lynch.(mro)
March 2, 2011 Filing 1700 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristen Haynes.(mro)
March 2, 2011 Filing 1551 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Pamela Register.(pl)
March 1, 2011 Filing 2139 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jonathan Y. Lee.(tro)
March 1, 2011 Filing 2138 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephen Jarman.(tro)
March 1, 2011 Filing 2137 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Speer.(tro)
March 1, 2011 Filing 2136 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Danielle Harrison.(tro)
March 1, 2011 Filing 2135 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christina Joseph.(tro)
March 1, 2011 Filing 2134 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Brown.(tro)
March 1, 2011 Filing 2131 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Shelia Roby.(tro)
March 1, 2011 Filing 2130 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark Patterson.(tro)
March 1, 2011 Filing 2129 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stephen E. Nugent.(tro)
March 1, 2011 Filing 1560 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Robert Kazma.(mro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2128 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cristal Quintana.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2127 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joseph Medolla.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2126 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gilbert Navarro.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2125 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ashely Grady.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2124 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mark Palace.(tro) Modified on 4/4/2011 (tro).
February 28, 2011 Filing 2123 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Stan Singley.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2122 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Deirdre Evavold.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2121 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joseph Steele.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2120 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kimberly Levine.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2119 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Quinton Nealy.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2118 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by William James DiGiacomo.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2117 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Walter Kokidko.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2116 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Shanti Daya.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2115 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dima McCuiston.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2114 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jacqueline Kennedy.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2113 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Ernest Duncan.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2112 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Elizabeth Sands.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2111 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Shelley Pappas.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2110 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Dione Miller.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2109 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kristie Ross.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2108 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jodi Lammert.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2107 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jeff Brouwer.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2106 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Megan Molinaro.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2105 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Derrick Davis.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2104 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Therese Hollingsworth.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2102 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cynthia Neuhofel.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2101 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Charles Flint.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2100 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Shewmake.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2099 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Cragin Orr.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2098 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Karilyn Sowers.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2097 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jamye McIntyre.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2096 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Bartlette Dewitt.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2095 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amy S. Leopold.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2094 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Gina Weiler.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2093 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Linda Rabin.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2092 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sandra Carovano.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2091 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Amal Salameh.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2090 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by John Jarrett, III.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2089 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Michael Thompson.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2088 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tina Brady.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2087 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sally Freeman.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2086 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kim St Clair.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2085 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tonya Loftis.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2084 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Joy Flatley.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2080 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Timothy Lebo.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2079 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jason Garns.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2078 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Craig Mann.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2077 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Anwar Montgomery.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2076 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kara Whalin.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2075 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Rahha Larijani.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2074 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Lori Tobias.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2073 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Portia Lott.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2072 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jade Cohen.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2071 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Kyle Wickey.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2057 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Heather Pfleegor.(tro) Modified on 3/22/2011 (tro).
February 28, 2011 Filing 2056 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Paula Glab Bickman.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2055 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Christine Berry.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 2054 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Shawn Dean.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 1766 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Thomas Guy.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 1563 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Scott A. Walker.(mro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 1562 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Sonya Lier.(mro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 1561 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Jennifer Bass.(mro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 1549 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Tegan Crouch.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 1548 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Terri Allen.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 1547 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Wada Meade.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 1546 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Mia Wells.(tro)
February 28, 2011 Filing 1545 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A. Document filed by Marvalesha French.(tro)
February 28, 2011