In Re: "A Million Little Pieces" Litigation Featured Case

Plaintiffs sued defendant james Frey, the author of "A Million Little Pieces," and alleged that the book contained material fabrications and that advertisements and marketing concerning the book were false and misleading inasmuch as the book was marketed as a work of nonfiction.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: Sara Rubenstein, Garrett Hauenstein, Jean Taylor, Ann Marie Strack, Pilar More, Marcia Vedral, Michele Snow, Karen Futernick, Jimmy Floyd, Diane Marolda, Jill Giles, Shera Paglinawan and Wendy Shaw
Defendant: James Frey, Random House Inc., Big Jim Industries Inc., Doubleday & Company, Inc., Knopf Publishing Group, Inc., Vintage Anchor Publishing, Inc., Barnes and Noble, Inc., Barnes and Noble Booksellers, Inc., Barnes and Noble Publishing, Inc., Alfred A. Knopf Inc. doing business as Anchor Books, Bantam Doubleday Dell Publishing Group, Anchor Books, Kassie Evashevski, Sean McDonald, Nan A. Talese/Doubleday, Nan A. Talese and Random House, V.G. Inc.
Petitioner: "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group
Not Classified By Court: Connie Pentz
Case Number: 1:2006md01771
Filed: June 16, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Richard J Holwell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2008 Filing 84 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Alan S. Ripka dated 3/31/08 re: that Court grant request for full disclosure and review of records. ENDORSEMENT: If any counsel wishes to seek relief from the Court, that firm should proceed by motion with citation to relevant authorities. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/8/08) (rjm)
December 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER settling action. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/4/07) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(ml)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER The Court has reviewed the plaintiffs' supplemental brief regarding the designation of charities to receive Cy Pres Fund contributions. While the court agrees that the American Red Cross is an eminently worthwhile charity, I believe it would be more in keeping with the cy press doctrine to provide a benefit more closely related (albeit indirectly) to the interests of the class. As the class consists of book readers, I propose that the third beneficiary of the Cy Pres Fund be Reach Out and Read of Greater New York. The parties are requested to advise the Court by 12/10/07 whether they request the Court to reconsider its preliminary decision to designate Reach Out and Read of Greater New York as the third beneficiary of the Cy Pres Fund. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/29/07) (jco)
November 1, 2007 Filing 81 WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM. Document filed by Connie Pentz. (Stein, David)
November 1, 2007 Filing 80 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (61 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 60 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 70 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 69 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 28, 2007 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (66 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 75 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 76 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 65 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 65 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 67 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH) MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit A (Part II)#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit J#8 Exhibit K#9 Exhibit H#10 Exhibit I#11 Exhibit G#12 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 28, 2007 Filing 78 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion for Approval of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, Memorandum of Law and Declaration in Support Thereof served on Counsel of Record on 09/28/07. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 28, 2007 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (66 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 75 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 76 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 65 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 65 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 67 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH) MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 28, 2007 Filing 76 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 75 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Entry of Judgment served on All Counsel Of Record on 09/24/07. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (61 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 60 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 70 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 69 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Kimberly K. Ness in Support re: (61 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 60 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 70 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 69 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Larry Drury, Esquire in Support re: (61 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 60 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 70 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 69 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (61 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 60 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 70 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 69 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 70 MOTION to Approve Finall Settlement and Entry of Judgment. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Final Judgment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 69 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Entry of Judgment. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Order and Judgment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 7, 2007 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
May 15, 2007 Filing 67 Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement; regarding summary of the lawsuit and proposed settlement, as set forth in this Notice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/14/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(kkc)
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting Motion for preliminary Approval of Settlement; the following class, as indicated in this Order, is conditionally certified pursuant to Rule 23(b)(3); plaintiffs Marcia Vedral and michele Snow are designated as class representatives of the Settlement Class; the final hearing to determine whether the settlement is fair, reasonable, and adequate, and whether it should be approved by the Court, will be conducted on 11/2/2007 at 10:00 am in the courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, new York, NY 10007...(Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/14/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(kkc) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2007 (kkc).
May 3, 2007 Filing 65 NOTICE of Revised Exhibits to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Notice Plan re: (36 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 46 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 46 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 38 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 37 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 39 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH) Declaration in Support of Motion,,, (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
April 30, 2007 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
April 30, 2007 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
April 27, 2007 Filing 62 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF CONCERNING THE COURTS INQUIRY ON CLASS NOTICE. Document filed by James Frey, Random House Inc., Big Jim Industries Inc., Doubleday & Company, Inc., Random House, V.G. Inc..Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Andolina, Michael)
April 27, 2007 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
April 27, 2007 Filing 60 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
April 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/13/07) (rjm)
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. The parties are directed to appear for Oral Argument on the pending motion for preliminary approval of settlement, certification of settlement class, and approval of notice plan on Friday, 4/6/2007 10:00 AM. The conference will be held in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/12/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(rjm)
March 20, 2007 Filing 57 NOTICE of Order for Oral Argument on 04-06-07 at 10:00 AM, Courtroom 17B. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
March 2, 2007 Filing 56 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Stone, Ralph)
February 8, 2007 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of AMLP Reply Memorandum of Law in further Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Reply Declaration of Evan Smith in Further Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval and Proof of Mailing served on All Counsel of Record on February 8, 2007. Service was made by Mail and ECF. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
February 8, 2007 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
February 8, 2007 Filing 53 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
February 8, 2007 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan. (Response to Opposition of Plaintiff Sara Rubenstein to Address First Amendment Issues). Document filed by James Frey, Random House Inc., Big Jim Industries Inc., Doubleday & Company, Inc., Random House, V.G. Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Blocker, Mark)
February 2, 2007 Filing 51 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Thomas M. Mullaney dated 1/23/07 re: Granted request for extension of time (from 1/26/07) by which any party may reply to Ptff Rubenstein's Opposition to "A million little pieces" Group's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement....Replies due by 2/8/2007. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/1/07) (rjm)
January 19, 2007 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Bonner, James)
January 4, 2007 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law, Declarations of Evan J. Smith; Larry D. Drury, and Thomas Mullaney, all in support of AMLP Plaintiffs' Group's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Clas Action Settlement, Class Certification and Notice Plan; and Proof of Mailing on January 4, 2007. Service was made by ECF and Mail. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: #42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Part I)#2 Exhibit B (Part II)#3 Exhibit B (Part III)#4 Exhibit B (Part IV)#5 Exhibit B (Part V))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: #42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement)#2 Executed Signature Pages to Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A above)#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: #42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement)#2 Executed Signature Pages to Settlement Agreement#3 Full Exhibit B (including newspaper listings) to Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A above) (Part I)#4 Full Exhibit B (including newspaper listings) to Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A above) (Part II)#5 Full Exhibit B (including newspaper listings) to Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A above) (Part III)#6 Exhibit C#7 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Thomas M. Mullaney, Esquire in Support re: #42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Larry D. Drury, Esquire in Support re: #42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Return Date set for 1/26/2007 09:00 AM. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
December 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (for attorneys Jocelyn D. Franceour and Derek J. Meyer). (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/31/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(rjm, )
November 21, 2006 Filing 40 NOTICE of. Document filed by Diane Marolda. (Mullaney, Thomas)
November 1, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/26/2006, Receipt Number 595281. (kkc, )
November 1, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/26/2006, Receipt Number 595281. (kkc, )
November 1, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/26/2006, Receipt Number 595282. (kkc, )
November 1, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/26/2006, Receipt Number 595282. (kkc, )
October 27, 2006 Filing 39 Notice of MOTION filed by admitted attorney Ann E. Schofield,Esq, for Jocelyn D.Francoeur to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant James Frey, w/Affidavit in Support and Certificate of Good Standing, Wisc. Sup. Court.Document filed by James Frey.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJHrmc,)Forwarded to Chambers Holwell 10/27/06
October 27, 2006 Filing 38 Notice of MOTION by admitted attorney Ann E. Schofield, Esq.,for Derek J. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant - James Freyw/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing Sup Ct Illinois.Document filed by Ann E Schofield, Esq.,.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJHrmc,)Forwarded to Chambers 10/27/06
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of "Confidential Information". (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/27/06) This document relates to: ALL ACTIONS.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(sn)
October 19, 2006 Filing 36 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by Diane Marolda. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH (Mullaney, Thomas) Modified on 10/27/2006 (sn).
October 16, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #32 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/16/06, Receipt Number 593596. (rjm, )
October 16, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #33 Order Admitting Attorneys Pro Hac Vice,,, in the amount of $75.00, paid on 10/16/06, Receipt Number 593598. (rjm, )
October 16, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 32 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/16/06, Receipt Number 593596. (rjm, )
October 16, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 33 Order Admitting Attorneys Pro Hac Vice,,, in the amount of $75.00, paid on 10/16/06, Receipt Number 593598. (rjm, )
October 12, 2006 Filing 35 DECLARATION of James P. Bonner in Support re: #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
October 12, 2006 Filing 34 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorneys Michael C. Andolina, Mark Bruce Blocker and Marissa J. Reich for Defendants Alfred A. Knopf Inc., Anchor Books, Bantam Doubleday Dell Publishing Group, Barnes and Noble Booksellers, Inc., Barnes and Noble Publishing, Inc., Barnes and Noble, Inc., Knopf Publishing Group, Inc., Nan A. Talese/Doubleday, Random House, V.G. Inc., Nan A. Talese, Vintage Anchor Publishing, Inc. (added in case no. 06md1771), admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/9/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(rjm, )
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY Larry D. Drury PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Plaintiff Marcia Vedral. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/9/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(rjm, )
October 4, 2006 Filing 31 DECLARATION of James P. Bonner in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
October 4, 2006 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
October 4, 2006 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Service was made by Mail and ECF. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
October 4, 2006 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Exvan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit D#3 Exhibit E#4 Exhibit I#5 Exhibit J)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
October 4, 2006 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C (Part I)#4 Exhibit C (Part II)#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit D#10 Exhibit I#11 Exhibit J)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
October 4, 2006 Filing 26 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. A conference having been held in the captioned matter on 9/13/06, the Court appoints Thomas M. Mullaney as Ptffs' liaison counsel in this matter. Additionally, the Court adopts the following briefing schedule: Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.: Responses due by 10/4/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/14/06). (rjm, )
September 25, 2006 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit F (Four Parts) to Smith Declaration re: #20 Declaration in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F (Part II) to Smith Declaration#2 Exhibit F (Part III) to Smith Declaration#3 Exhibit F (Part IV) to Smith Declaration)(Smith, Evan)
September 25, 2006 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit E (three parts) to Smith Declaration re: #20 Declaration in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E (Part II) to Smith Declaration#2 Exhibit E (Part III) to Smith Declaration)(Smith, Evan)
September 25, 2006 Filing 22 NOTICE of of Filing of Exhibit C (Three Parts) to Smith Declaration re: #20 Declaration in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C (Part II) to Smith Declaration#2 Exhibit C (Part III) to Smith Declaration)(Smith, Evan)
September 25, 2006 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits D, G, H, and I to Smith Declaration re: #20 Declaration in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G to Smith Declaration#2 Exhibit H to Smith Declaration#3 Exhibit I to Smith Declaration)(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Service was made by MAIL and ECF. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Scott Frost, Esquire in Support re: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion for Appointment of Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as Interim Counsel and Supporting Documents on September 22, 2006. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
September 22, 2006 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Mitch Kalcheim in Support re: #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
September 22, 2006 Filing 11 DECLARATION of James P. Bonner in Support re: #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
September 22, 2006 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
September 22, 2006 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
September 14, 2006 Case Designated ECF. (rjm, )
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1: All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case, shall complete & file a CM/ECF attorney registration form (which can be found on the court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov.); All attorneys who wish to be admitted for purposes of this case shall send a motion to be admitted pro hac vice to John Sacco at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, Room 249, New York, NY 10007. In addition to the documentation required by the Local Rules for the Southern & Eastern Districts of NY, Civil Rule 1.3, attorneys wishing to appear pro hac vice must also include w/their motion a check for $25.00 payable to the Clerk of the Court & a completed CM/ECF attorney registration form; All documents filed in the MDL case & the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov; Amended complaints & supplemental pleadings shall provide a list of the additional parties & indicate the action or actions to which they are being added. Similarly, a filing removing parties shall indicate the parties being removed and the action or actions from which they are being removed. A filing which adds a party or parties who has not been named in any of the consolidated actions shall provide a separate listing of such parties, indicating that they have not yet been named. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(rjm, )
September 5, 2006 Filing 7 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Mark B. Blocker dated 8/22/06 re: application granted, the 9/13/06 conference is adjourned to 2:30 pm on 9/13/06. Conference set for 9/13/2006 02:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/25/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH,1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH,1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 1:06-cv-05402-RJH. Also entered as Doc. #14 in 06cv669.(rjm, ).
August 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1407(a). This Order shall govern the practice and procedure in those actions transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation purs. to its order of 6/14/06... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of transferred actions listed on attached Schedule A. Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 8/23/06, 2:30 PM is adjourned and reset to 9/13/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell in Crtrm. 17B, 500 Pearl Street, NY NY. Counsel may furnish suggestions for items to be included on the agenda for this conference on or before 9/8/06. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/31/06). This Document relates to All Cases. (rjm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2006 (rjm, ).
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled in this multidistrict litigation for 8/2/06, 2:30pm is adjourned. Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/26/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(rjm, )
July 27, 2006 Filing 3 NOTICE of Request for Continuance of Re-scheduled Status Conference. Document filed by Michele Snow. (Smith, Evan)
July 17, 2006 Filing 5 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-1)... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the Northern District of Illinois, C.A. No. 1:06-1021, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard J. Holwell, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/26/06) (rjm, ).
June 26, 2006 Filing 2 NOTICE of Request for status conference.. Document filed by Michele Snow. (Smith, Evan)
June 16, 2006 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the Central District of California, Northern District of Illinois, Southern District of New York, Southern District of Ohio, and Western District of Washington and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard J. Holwell, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in those districts and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/14/2006) (kkc, )
June 16, 2006 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the Central District of California, Northern District of Illinois, Southern District of New York, Southern District of Ohio, and Western District of Washington and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard J. Holwell, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in those districts and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/14/2006) (kkc, )
June 16, 2006 CASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:06-cv-669 (RJH), 1:06-cv-693 (RJH), 1:06-cv-1167 (RJH). (kkc, )
June 16, 2006 Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (kkc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: "A Million Little Pieces" Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Rubenstein
Represented By: Amber S. Healy
Represented By: Mitch H. Kalcheim
Represented By: James Patrick Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Hauenstein
Represented By: Amy M. Boomhouwer
Represented By: Christopher Wren Taylor
Represented By: Hector G.. Gancedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Taylor
Represented By: Amy M. Boomhouwer
Represented By: Christopher Wren Taylor
Represented By: Hector G.. Gancedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Strack
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilar More
Represented By: Thomas E. Pakenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Vedral
Represented By: Ilan J. Chorowsky
Represented By: Larry Daniel Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Snow
Represented By: Evan J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Futernick
Represented By: Alan Seth Ripka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Floyd
Represented By: Alan Seth Ripka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Marolda
Represented By: Thomas M. Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Giles
Represented By: Alan J. Statman
Represented By: Colleen Marie Hegge
Represented By: Scott Carter Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shera Paglinawan
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Shaw
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group
Represented By: Evan J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Frey
Represented By: Derek J. Meyer
Represented By: Jocelyn D. Francoeur
Represented By: Matthew X. Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Random House Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McNamara
Represented By: Jennifer A. Ratner
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Represented By: Rebecca Green Goldstein
Represented By: Stephen G. Contopulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Jim Industries Inc.
Represented By: Matthew X. Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doubleday & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Ratner
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Represented By: Rebecca Green Goldstein
Represented By: Stephen G. Contopulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knopf Publishing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Anchor Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes and Noble, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes and Noble Booksellers, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes and Noble Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred A. Knopf Inc. doing business as Anchor Books
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bantam Doubleday Dell Publishing Group
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Books
Represented By: Fred B. Burnside
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Represented By: Stuart R. Dunwoody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kassie Evashevski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nan A. Talese/Doubleday
Represented By: Fred B. Burnside
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Represented By: Stuart R. Dunwoody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nan A. Talese
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Random House, V.G. Inc.
Represented By: Marissa J. Reich
Represented By: Mark Bruce Blocker
Represented By: Matthew C. Blickensderfer
Represented By: Michael C. Andolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Connie Pentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?