In Re: Fosamax Products Liability Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Paula R. Herken, Mary Ann Haynes, Kathleen Mazzucco, Curtis Larson, Francine Koldoff, Margie Claxton, All Plaintiffs in 1:07-cv-9482, All Plaintiffs in 1:07-cv-9480, Patty M. Herd, Ramon L. Harrison, PSC, Glenn Vasbinder, Wilma L. Cross, Betty Kyle, Shail V. Mehta, Sylvia Clarke, Ronald L. Allsop, Arlene Weiss, Anne Forman, Jo Anne Gladin De La Fuente, All Plaintiffs in 1:07-cv-3294, Vivianne Zorilla-dela torre, Ruby Stratton, Joseph Fred Sargent, Jr., Suzanne Dengel, Mary Richardson, Marianne Beechler, Stephen K. Goya, Carolyn Lopreato, Virginia Caldwell, Sandra Boniol, Ulrike Dempsey, Ursula Tyler, Okcha Cho, Laurie Nelson, Maureen J. Jones, Ejner B. Jacobsen, Delores Moore, Sylvia Potts, Betty Case, Vera Mae Stolt, Virginia Bergeson, Sheri L Terry, Marilyn E. Hammond, Sharyn Turner, Maria P. Fuentes, Bertha Sullivan Roberts, Denielle Hone, Judith Stuppiello, Essie Small, Myra S. Allsopp, Julia Paulen, Dorothy M. Mayfield, Bessie L. Fleming, Elaine Traylor, Mardell Larcen, Juanita Williams, Frank Secrest, Girlene Wilson, Jincy Endsley, Joyce Steele, Patrick L. Aloia, Stacy Strong, Carole A. Klotz, James Napier, Robert Miljan, Amy Willis, Richard Williams, Jay Stoddard, James E. Byrd, Aaron Wahl, Dorothea Thompson, Carolee Corley, Helen Mcgee, Betty A Conklin, Doris Hanke, Lillian Dorfman, Arlene Cobb, Roslynn Werfelmann, Robert J. Smith, Jeanne Morang, Anne O. Carballo, Aline Trahan, Kenny Clarke, Stanley Ebert, Rayshello Morrow, Rosa Murawa, Sr. Aubrey Perry, Ph.D. Kathleen Kingston-mitchell, Shirley A. Grizzle, Sarah McPhail, Burdette Burt, Kathy Herring, Theresa Marcone, Vivian C. Wood, Victoria Miller, Patricia Kincaid, William Rosenstein, Elizabeth K. Brown, Beverly Rosen, Misty Nall, Linda Secrest, Veronica Vizena, Corinne I. Davis, Robert Dennis Jones, Alan Carr, Martha Tuskes, Patricia A Finnerty, Sandra Hirsch, Richard Dahl, Miogene Alexander, Teresa N Etherton, Winifred Deyle, James Corbett, All Plaintiffs in 1:07-cv-1320, Lilly Hartle, Janet DeVivo, Diane Fischer, Gary Plasschaert, Lloyd McCleese, Betty Miljan, Joanne S Walker, Johanna Peters Welty, Claudette Williams, Bonnie Boerste, William Molnar, Mary Jane Pauling-Jones, Juanita K. Hunter, Robert Dufner, Donald R. Bevin, Connie Smith, Elizabeth Brenseke, Jack Cuthbert, Ed Dempsey, Edward A. Morris, Kelley Aldrich, Gloria Bender, Lisa Byrne, Beryl Sedatol, Fred Christensen, William A. Mayfield, Bonnie Yorke, Karen Denise Greene, Frances Robertson, Mary Riley, Una Byrne, Son Terry Kozlin, Anthonia Ryan, All Plaintiffs in 1:07-cv-7295, Barry Dorfman, All Plaintiffs in 1:07-cv-1321, Susan J. Spellman, All Plaintiffs in 1:07-cv-7290, Alex J Martinez, Reyna Vandercar, Ronna Greene, Barbara Want, Fredericka Allen, Greta Murphy, Avril Evans, Nancy L. McCormick, Emily Northrup, Leonora Wilson, Ethel Woodard, Nellie Wade, Sarah Raber, Ruth McCleese, Ronald Purdy, Elizabeth J. Potter, Carlee Thomson, Joanne McAvey, Clyde Thomas Rhyne, Melba Rogers, Lilia R Martinez, Joseph Stuppiello, Raymond Smith, Carol Parker, K Karene Eades, Donald Byrne, Robert Burns, Patricia Newton, Thomas M Poaps, Julie Lowell, Thomas Bird, Mona Deleonardis, Sigrid Charles, Joseph Hines, Nanette Heard, Lois A Clifton, Pamela Dee Elliott, Sivia Blahut, Susan Reynolds, Myrtle A Helfers, Sheldon Gottesfeld, George William Miller, III, Carolyn Hester, Beverly Hille, Carmen Carr, Fred Moorman, Roger Krechel, Helen Butterworth, Mary J. Morris, Joan Dorf, James Douglas, Theodore F. Joseph, Audrey Kime, Linda F. Hennrich, Shirley Boles, Vivian Rowell, Judy Semenchuk, Joseph Cauchi and Karen Johnson
Defendant: Roche Laboratories, Inc., P&GP, Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., SmithKline Beecham Corporation, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, US, L.L.C., D.D.S. Theodore Kielts, Glaxosmithkline LLC, Cobalt Laboratories, Inc., No. 2, Hoffman-La Roche, Inc., Merck and Co, Inc, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, John Doe Drug Companies 1-100, No. 4, Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corp., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme (I.A.) Corp., No.2 Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., f/k/a Merck & Co., Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Mylan Inc, Barr Laboratories, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., No. 3, No. 1, Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Walgreen Co., Warner Chillcott Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Merck & Co., Inc., No.1 Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and D.D.S. Mouhannad Budeir
Consolidated Plaintiff: Harold Amick, Kathryn McEachern, Carolyn J. Gilman, Maria Palacios, Alexandra V. Boone, Betty Martin and Julia Garcia
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Gerald Debacco and Joan Clayton
Special Master: John D. Feerick
Interested Party: Margaret Cartelli
Case Number: 1:2006md01789
Filed: August 18, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: James C Francis
Referring Judge: John F Keenan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 2588 LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Sarah S. Vance dated 7/9/2018 re: On behalf of the entire Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, I thank you for serving as a transferee judge. (anc)
June 7, 2018 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (tro)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2587 ORDER: The Court has advised the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that all member cases in this matter have been closed. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/7/2018) (anc)
May 22, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John F. Keenan: Status Conference held on 5/22/2018. (Court Reporter Anita Trombetta) (wr)
May 14, 2018 Filing 2586 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #2582 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Virginia Meldon. (Abaray, Janet)
May 9, 2018 Filing 2585 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #2582 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Virginia Meldon. (Abaray, Janet)
May 9, 2018 Filing 2584 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #2578 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Mary Riley. (Thornburgh, Daniel)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2583 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel of Calvin S. Tregre, Jr.. Document filed by Virginia Meldon. (Abaray, Janet)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2582 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court directs that the appropriate lien certifications be supplied to William J. Beausoleil of Hughes Hubbard & Reed at One Battery Park Plaza, New York, New York, 10004, by May 10, 2018, or that counsel for Virginia Meldon and Flossie Dague show cause why these lien certifications have not been supplied. Failure to supply the lien certifications to Merck has prevented these clients from receiving their settlement awards. The settlement awards should be made immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-01051-JFK(anc)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2581 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court directs that the appropriate lien certifications be supplied to William J. Beausoleil of Hughes Hubbard & Reed at One Battery Park Plaza, New York, New York, 10004, by May 10, 2018, or that counsel for claimant in the above-named action - Daisy Johnson - show cause why these lien certifications have not been supplied. Failure to supply the lien certifications to Merck has prevented this client from receiving her settlement award. The settlement award should be made immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-05487-JFK(anc)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2580 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court directs that the appropriate lien certifications be supplied to William J. Beausoleil of Hughes Hubbard & Reed at One Battery Park Plaza, New York, New York, 10004, by May 10, 2018, or that counsel for claimant in the above-named action - Charleszetta Simpson - show cause why these lien certifications have not been supplied. Failure to supply the lien certifications to Merck has prevented this client from receiving her settlement award. The settlement award should be made immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-04219-JFK(anc)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2579 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court directs that the appropriate lien certifications be supplied to William J. Beausoleil of Hughes Hubbard & Reed at One Battery Park Plaza, New York, New York, 10004, by May 10, 2018, or that counsel for claimants in the above-named action - Nancy and John Barbaro, Marilyn Cole (for the Estate of Rosaline Jones), Zona Dewitt, Seak Peng Kam, and Mary Ellen Cox - show cause why these lien certifications have not been supplied. Failure to supply the lien certifications to Merck has prevented these clients from receiving their settlement awards. The settlement awards should be made immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/16/2018) (anc)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2578 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court directs that the appropriate lien certifications be supplied to William J. Beausoleil of Hughes Hubbard & Reed at One Battery Park Plaza, New York, New York, 10004, by May 10, 2018, or that counsel for claimant in the above-named action - Mary Riley - show cause why these lien certifications have not been supplied. Failure to supply the lien certifications to Merck has prevented this client from receiving her settlement award. The settlement award should be made immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-02102-JFK(anc)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2577 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court directs that the appropriate lien certifications be supplied to William J. Beausoleil of Hughes Hubbard & Reed at One Battery Park Plaza, New York, New York, 10004, by May 10, 2018, or that counsel for claimant in the above-named action - Anita Workman - show cause why these lien certifications have not been supplied. Failure to supply the lien certifications to Merck has prevented this client from receiving her settlement award. The settlement award should be made immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05006-JFK(anc)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2576 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court directs that the appropriate lien certifications be supplied to William J. Beausoleil of Hughes Hubbard & Reed at One Battery Park Plaza, New York, New York, 10004, by May 10, 2018, or that counsel for claimants in the above - named action-Karen and Paul Kirby - show cause why these lien certifications have not been supplied. Failure to supply the lien certifications to Merck has prevented these clients from receiving their settlement award. The settlement award should be made immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-01300-JFK(anc)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2575 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court directs that the appropriate lien certifications be supplied to William J. Beausoleil of Hughes Hubbard & Reed at One Battery Park Plaza, New York, New York, 10004, by May 10, 2018, or that counsel for claimants in the above-named action - Richard Trenk and Piyasili Trenk - show cause why these lien certifications have not been supplied. Failure to supply the lien certifications to Merck has prevented these clients from receiving their settlement award. The settlement award should be made immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-01294-JFK(anc)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2574 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court directs that the appropriate lien certifications be supplied to William J. Beausoleil of Hughes Hubbard & Reed at One Battery Park Plaza, New York, New York, 10004, by May 10, 2018, or that counsel for claimants in the above-named action - Jeri and Frank Demsky, and Mary Weiland - show cause why these lien certifications have not been supplied. Failure to supply the lien certifications to Merck has prevented these clients from receiving their settlement awards. The settlement awards should be made immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09479-JFK(anc)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2573 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court directs that the appropriate lien certifications be supplied to William J. Beausoleil of Hughes Hubbard & Reed at One Battery Park Plaza, New York, New York, 10004, by May 10, 2018, or that counsel for claimants in the above-named action - Saeeda Mubeen and Don Wayne, Personal Representative for the Estate of Lisa Wayne - show cause why these lien certifications have not been supplied. Failure to supply the lien certifications to Merck has prevented these clients from receiving their settlement awards. The settlement awards should be made immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07290-JFK(anc)
April 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John F. Keenan: Status Conference held on 4/12/2018. (Court Reporter Steven Griffing) (wr)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2572 ORDER: A status conference is set for Thursday, April 12, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. The purpose of this conference is to discuss the closing of this MDL case. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 4/12/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge John F. Keenan.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/26/2018) (anc)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2571 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby agreed by and between Plaintiff and GlaxoSmithKline LLC, and Roche Laboratories Inc. (hereinafter collectively referred to as "Boniva Defendants") that all claims against Boniva Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against either party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/14/2018) (anc)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2570 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby agreed by and between Plaintiff and GlaxoSmithKline LLC and Roche Laboratories Inc. (hereinafter collectively referred as "Boniva Defendants") that all claims against Boniva Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against either party. (Docketed in 6md1789 and 11cv5151) GlaxosmithKline, LLC and Roche Laboratories, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/14/2018) (ap) Modified on 2/16/2018 (ap).
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2569 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby agreed by and between Plaintiff and GlaxoSmithKline LLC, and Roche Laboratories Inc. (hereinafter collectively referred to as "Boniva Defendants") that all claims against Boniva Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against either party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/14/2018) (anc)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2568 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby agreed by and between Plaintiff and GlaxoSmithKline LLC (incorrectly named as SmithKline Beecham Corp. d/b/a/ GlaxoSmithKline) and Roche Laboratories Inc. (hereinafter collectively referred to as "Boniva Defendants") that all claims against Boniva Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against either party. (Docketed in 6md1789 and 10cv7420) Roche Laboratories, Inc. and Smithkline Beechum Corporation terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/14/2018) (ap) Modified on 2/15/2018 (ap).
February 14, 2018 Filing 2567 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby agreed by and between Plaintiff, GlaxoSmithKline LLC (incorrectly named as SmithKline Beechum Corp. d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline), and Roche Laboratories Inc. (hereinafter collectively referred as "Boniva Defendants") that all claims against Boniva Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against either party. Roche Laboratories, Inc. and SmithKline Beechum Corporation terminated. (Docketed in 6md1789 and 7cv8038) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/14/2018) (ap) Modified on 2/14/2018 (ap). Modified on 2/16/2018 (ap).
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2566 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby agreed by and between Plaintiff and GlaxoSmithKline LLC and Roche Laboratories Inc. (hereinafter collectively referred as "Boniva Defendants") that all claims against Boniva Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against either party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/14/2018) (anc)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2565 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby agreed by and between Plaintiff and SmithKline Beechum Corp. d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline (previously dismissed), GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Roche Laboratories Inc., Genentech, Inc. (previously dismissed), Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., Roche Therapeutics Inc. (previously dismissed), and Roche Holdings, Inc. (previously dismissed) (hereinafter collectively referred as "Boniva Defendants") that all claims against Boniva Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against either party. Roche Laboratories, Inc. (a Delaware corporation, 340 Kingsland Street, Nutley, NJ 07110-1150), GlaxosmithKline, LLC (a Delaware corporation, One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19101) and Hoffman-Laroche, Inc. (a New Jersey corporation, 340 Kingsland Street, Nutley, NJ 07110-1150) terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/14/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05068-JFK (ap) Modified on 2/15/2018 (ap). Modified on 2/16/2018 (ap).
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2564 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby agreed by and between Plaintiff, GlaxoSmithKline LLC (incorrectly named as SmithKline Beechum Corp. d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline), and Roche Laboratories Inc. (hereinafter collectively referred as "Boniva Defendants") that all claims against Boniva Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against either party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/14/2018) (anc) Modified on 2/14/2018 (anc).
February 14, 2018 Filing 2563 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby agreed by and between Plaintiff and GlaxoSmithKline LLC and Roche Laboratories Inc. (hereinafter collectively referred as "Boniva Defendants") that all claims against Boniva Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against either party. (Docketed in 6md1789 and 11cv5170) GlaxosmithKline, LLC and Roche Laboratories, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/14/2018) (ap) Modified on 2/14/2018 (ap). Modified on 2/16/2018 (ap).
October 31, 2017 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (wb)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2562 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from John J. Vecchione dated 4/12/2017 re: Please have my email removed from the ECF system for this case. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Attorney John Julian Vecchione terminated.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/19/2017) (anc)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2561 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case, and all claims asserted with this case, are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4l(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Ronald Purdy (Sherry Purdy's personal representative) and Ronald Purdy terminated.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/17/2017) (anc)
April 13, 2017 Filing 2560 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Plaintiffs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Merck sharp & dohme corp.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:14-cv-03017-JFK(Beausoleil, William)
April 12, 2017 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #2560 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (anc)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2559 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Peggy Mattingly, and Defendant, Merck & Co., Inc. nka Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case, and all claims asserted with this case, are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Peggy Mattingly terminated.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/10/2017) (anc)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2558 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Claire Perry and Aubrey Perry, and Defendant, Merck & Co., Inc. nka Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case, and all claims asserted with this case, are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/8/2017) (anc)
January 26, 2017 Filing 2556 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: that all claims against Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Watson Laboratories, Inc., in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against either party. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/26/17) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-01414-JFK(tn)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2557 ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE SHERRY PURDY. This Court having considered the motion seeking to substitute Sherry Purdy with personal representative Ronald Purdy for Plaintiff, pursuant to Rule 25(a)(1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that deceased Plaintiff Sherry Purdy by substituted by Ronald Purdy, Sherry Purdy's personal representative. SO ORDERED. Granting (34) Motion to Substitute Party in case 1:14-cv-03017-JFK. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/24/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789 JFK-JCF, 1:14-cv-03017-JFK (rjm)
September 6, 2016 Filing 2555 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF et al.(Beausoleil, William)
August 22, 2016 Filing 2554 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Appearance of James C. Fraser. Document filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF et al.(Zousmer, Julia)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2553 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Constance Alexander, and Defendant, Merck & Co., Inc. nka Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case, and all claims asserted with this case, are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/17/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-03130-JFK(kko)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2552 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/12/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-13540-JFK(tn)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2551 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Sandra J. Wunderlich dated 7/1/2016 re: I respectfully request that the Court terminate Sun as a party to this suit before the pretrial conference scheduled for July 11, 2016. ENDORSEMENT: The claims against all parties having been dismissed, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. Party Sun Pharma Global (a foreign corporation) and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (a Michigan corporation) terminated in case no. 11cv3702. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/7/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-03702-JFK (rjm)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2550 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF; granting (141) Motion for Matthew O'Neil Greenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09214-JFK. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/5/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-09214-JFK (tn)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2549 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Myra S. Allsopp and Ronald L. Allsopp, and Defendants Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed in its entirety as to all parties with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/5/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-08308-JFK(tn)
June 29, 2016 Filing 2548 STIPULATION OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: The undersigned hereby consent to the substitution of DUGHI, HEWIT & DOMALEWSKI, P.C. as Attorneys for the Defendants, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Roche Laboratories Inc., SmithKlineBeecham d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline and/or Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. This substitution of attorney pertains to all cases and Defendants listed in "Schedule A" attached hereto. Attorney Jacqueline Eve Shulman for Glaxosmithkline LLC,Jacqueline Eve Shulman for Hoffman-La Roche, Inc.,Jacqueline Eve Shulman for Hoffman-La Roche, Inc.,Jacqueline Eve Shulman for Roche Laboratories, Inc.,Jacqueline Eve Shulman for SmithKline Beecham Corporation,Jacqueline Eve Shulman for SmithKline Beecham Corporation added. Attorney Walter T. Johnson; Mary R. Pawelek - PHV; Charles F. Rysavy; Christopher R. Carton and Randall L. Christian terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/29/2016) ***Filed in 06md1789 and cases listed on Schedule A. (tn)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2547 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between undersigned counsel of record, that all claims against Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc. in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Watson Laboratories, Inc. and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/29/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-01032-JFK(tn)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2546 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sally M. Grovom, and Defendant Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, successor in interest to Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Defendant sanofi-aventis U.S. LLC, f/k/a Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc., through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/7/2016) (tn)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2545 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Betty Miljan and Robert Miljan, and Defendants Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., Roche Laboratories Inc., Genentech, Inc., and GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Warner Chilcott (US), LLC, successor In interest to Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Warner Chilcott Pharmaceuticals, Inc. which was incorrectly named as Defendant Warner Chillcott Pharmaceuticals Inc., f/k/a Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., f/k/a sanofi-aventis U.S. Inc., sanofi-aventis U.S. LLC, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed in its entirety as to all parties with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/24/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-05616-JFK(tn)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2544 NOTICE AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), Plaintiff, Josie Laster, hereby dismisses the above-captioned case with prejudice as to all defendants. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/23/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-07800-JFK(tn)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2543 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sharron Lynch, and Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Does 1 through 10, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case, and all claims asserted with this case, are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/19/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:14-cv-01649-JFK(tn)
May 6, 2016 Filing 2542 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Christopher Carton, New Attorney: Jacqueline Shulman, Address: Dughi, Hewit & Domalewski, P.C., 340 North Avenue East, Cranford, New Jersey, USA 07016, 908-272-0200. Document filed by Glaxosmithkline LLC, Hoffman-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc., SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham Corporation(doing business as GlaxoSmithKline). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shulman, Jacqueline)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2541 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD IN PLAINTIFF MARIA COMBS LAWSUIT: This Court, having considered the Motion To Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff Maria Combs ("Motion"), along with any responses and replies, is of the opinion that the Motion should be GRANTED. The law firms of Aylstock, Witkin, Kreis & Overholtz, PLLC; Gancedo Law Firm (f/k/a Gancedo & Nieves, LLP) and Andrus Wagstaff, P.C; along with any firms or attorneys referring to them or collaborating with them on Mrs. Comb's above-captioned lawsuit, are hereby dismissed as counsel. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/28/2016) (spo)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2540 JOINT PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: All case-specific fact discovery shall be completed on or before July 25, 2016, subject to the limitations on case-specific fact discovery contained in CMO 3 and other orders of this Court. Plaintiff will serve her Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures by August 5, 2016. Defendant will serve its Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures by September 5, 2016. Defendant will take Plaintiff's experts' depositions by September 5, 2016. Plaintiff will take Defendant's experts' depositions by September 30, 2016. All discovery is to be completed by September 30, 2016. Deposition due by 9/30/2016. Fact Discovery due by 7/25/2016. Discovery due by 9/30/2016. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/25/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-03130-JFK(mro)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2539 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/21/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09479-JFK(mro)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2537 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: that pursuant to Rules 16 and 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, that the plaintiffs listed in Appendix I to this Order shall produce the following documents in accordance with the schedule set forth below: Completed Plaintiff Profile Forms, records requested therein, and executed Authorizations for Release of Medical Records for each Plaintiff in MDL 1789 pursuant to CMO #3. A Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Report, signed and sworn to by a qualified physician or other medical expert ("the expert") that includes the following: The name, professional address, and curriculum vitae of the expert, including a list of all publications authored by the expert within the preceding ten years; A list of the Plaintiffs medical records reviewed by the expert prior to the preparation of the Expert Report, as well as copies of any such records not posted on the website of MRC, the vendor that has collected various medical records in this litigation and made those records available to plaintiffs pursuant to the terms of paragraph 5 of CMO 13; The dates during which the Plaintiff used Fosamax and references to the evidence relied upon to determine such use (either the actual pages or the Bates stamped numbers); The name(s) of the physician(s) who prescribed Fosamax to the Plaintiff; Whether the expert believes to a reasonable degree of medical certainty that Fosamax caused Plaintiffs alleged injury, and if so, the factual and medical/scientific bases for that opinion; and The date, at least by month and year, when the expert believes to a reasonable degree of medical certainty the Plaintiff first developed the injury alleged to have been caused by Fosamax. This Order should be entered on the docket of 06 MD 1789 as well as on the dockets of the individual cases set forth in Appendix I. Merck should also mail a copy of this Order to all affected pro se Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/4/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-05936-JFK, 1:08-cv-04183-JFK, 1:14-cv-01649-JFK, 1:14-cv-03017-JFK(tn)
April 4, 2016 Filing 2536 RESPONSE to Motion re: (146 in 1:08-cv-04183-JFK) MOTION Lone Pine Order . . Document filed by Maria Combs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04183-JFK(Thornburgh, Daniel)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2535 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Doris Walls, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/30/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-03727-JFK(tn)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2534 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jacquelyn S. Decker, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/30/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-06404-JFK(tn)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2533 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Betty Abelson and Gregory Abelson, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/30/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-00931-JFK(tn)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2532 STIPULATION DISMISSING TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. WITH PREJUDICE: Plaintiff Essie Small, through her duly authorized counsel, hereby agrees and stipulates to the dismissal with prejudice and without fees or costs of all claims which were asserted or which could have been asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., in the above-captioned action, under the authority of Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/29/2016) (rjm)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2531 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Piyasili S. Trenk and Richard Trenk, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsei, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/29/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-01294-JFK (rjm)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2538 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Robert Joe Smith, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/21/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04183-JFK(tn)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2530 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jason Judd, Executor of the Estate of James D. Judd, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/21/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04094-JFK(tn)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2529 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kathleen Giebel, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/21/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09880-JFK(tn)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2528 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Oliva Undari, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/21/2016) (tn)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2527 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Patricia Owen-Lapine and John Lapine, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/21/2016) (tn)
March 21, 2016 Filing 2526 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Merck & Co., Inc.. (Zousmer, Julia)
March 21, 2016 Filing 2525 DECLARATION of William J. Beausoleil in Support re: #2523 MOTION Lone Pine Order .. Document filed by Merck & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Beausoleil, William)
March 21, 2016 Filing 2524 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #2523 MOTION Lone Pine Order . . Document filed by Merck & Co., Inc.. (Zousmer, Julia)
March 21, 2016 Filing 2523 MOTION Lone Pine Order . Document filed by Merck & Co., Inc..(Zousmer, Julia)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2522 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09479-JFK(ama)
March 15, 2016 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [2502 in Case 06-md-1789; #167 in Case 07cv9479] STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09479-JFK(ama)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2521 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. SO ORDERED. Saeeda Mubeen terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07290-JFK(kko)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2520 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. SO ORDERED. Don Wayne (personal representative of Lisa Wayne's estate) terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07290-JFK(kko)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2519 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Robert A. Rinderknecht, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) (ama)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2518 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Laurie Nelson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04106-JFK(kl)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2517 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Rose Newman, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-04296-JFK(ama)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2516 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Mary Norman and James Lorbeck, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants SmithKline Beecham Corporation d/b/aGlaxoSmithK1ine ("SKB"); GlaxoSmithKiine, LLC ("GSK"); Genentech, Inc.; Roche Holdings. Inc.; Hoffman-La Roche, Inc.; Roche Therapeutics, Inc.; and Roche Laboratories, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. Merck & Co., Inc. and Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-08673-JFK(kko)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2515 STIPULATION AND ORDER OR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jean Rose McQuilling, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07256-JFK(ama)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2514 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Debbie Shields, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) (tn)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2513 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Douglas Wyman, as the Successor of the Estate of Dorothy Collins, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case ishereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-08908-JFK(ama)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2512 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Manuela Sepulveda, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) (kko)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2511 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, ROY WILLIAM WILSON, Individually, and on behalf of GIRLENE C. WILSON, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-02221-JFK(tn)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2510 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Charleszetta Simpson, and the above-named defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (former known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Defendants, Louisiana State University Health Science Center-Shreveport and Louisiana State University Health Sciences Center-Monroe are hereby dismissed with prejudice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-04219-JFK(ama)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2509 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Deborah L. Miller and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-00940-JFK(tn)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2508 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above captioned case, VIRGINIA MELDON, and the above-named Defendant, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-01051-JFK(ama)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2507 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol French for the Est. of Phyllis French, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09330-JFK(tn)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2506 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, PATRICIA NEWTON AND THOMAS BIRD, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-07033-JFK(ama)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2505 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Charles W. Turner, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-06328-JFK(kko) Modified on 3/16/2016 (kko).
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2504 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Darlene Nelson and Eldred Nelson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-05208-JFK(kl) Modified on 3/16/2016 (kl).
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2503 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Veronica Vizena, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07497-JFK(tn)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2501 STIPULATION AND ORDER OR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joyce Raisor, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-07630-JFK(tn)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2500 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary Riley, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-02102-JFK(kl)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2499 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Millicent Tobias & Bernard Tobias, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) (tn)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2498 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Bobbie Macker, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) (tn)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2497 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, SUSAN STROUP, VMD and DANIEL P. STROUP, w/h and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp and Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07297-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2496 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, OK Chalmers, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05900-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2495 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Cheryl Babb in her capacity as authorized representative as Successor-in-Interest of Theodore Joseph, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-00213-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2494 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between plaintiff in the above-captioned case. Daisy Johnson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-05487-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2493 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sandra Hirsch, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) (tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2492 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Okcha Cho, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-05921-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2491 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Patricia Finnerty, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-05923-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2490 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sigrid Charles, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-05925-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2489 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, LaVerne Johnson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-05925-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2488 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Lou Jeanne and Richard Hamilton, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-11162-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2487 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Joan and Charles Ehrensing, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-00929-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2486 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sally V. Grovom, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Proctor & Gamble Demanded Pharmaceuticals, and Aventis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) (tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2485 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Karene K. Eades, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09519-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2484 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Maureen Jones for the Est. of Mary Ellen Newton, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-10523-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2483 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Bonnie Johnson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) (tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2482 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Joseph Hebert and Eleanor Hebert, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-05206-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2481 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Vickie Jones, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-05207-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2480 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, GITI AMIRANSARI, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-07213-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2479 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Marianne Beechler, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-09147-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2478 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gloria Bender as Personal Representative of Marianna Fahey, and Defendant. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-04579-JFK(tn)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2477 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Patti Grill, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/14/2016) (tn)
March 10, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John F. Keenan: Pre-Motion Conference held on 3/10/2016. (wr)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2476 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Donald Byrne and Lisa Byrne, Individually and as Personal Representatives for the Estate of Una Byrne, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/9/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-05912-JFK(tn)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2475 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Anna Huffman, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/9/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-14238-JFK(tn)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2474 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joyce Steele, on behalf of the Estate of Dorothy Edwards, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/9/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-06293-JFK(tn)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2473 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Bernice Theisen, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/9/2016) (tn)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2472 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ida Joyce Thomas, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/9/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-06475-JFK(tn)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2471 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, DOROTHEA AHLES, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/9/2016) (tn)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2470 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara Burg, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/9/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-01420-JFK(tn)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2469 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in above-captioned case, MILDRED KILLMEYER, and the above named Defendant, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (formerly known as Merck & Co. Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/24/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-08750-JFK(tn)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2468 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carl E. Kastendieck, surviving spouse of Vivian Kastendieck, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/24/2016) (tn)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2467 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol A. Riggs, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/24/2016) (tn)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2466 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Calogera Fruscione and Salvatore Fruscione, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/24/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09334-JFK(tn)
February 24, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John F. Keenan: Status Conference held on 2/24/2016. (wr)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2465 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara & Charles Booth, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/16/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-02971-JFK(tn)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2464 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Blake Burlingame as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Sandra Burlingame, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/16/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-10508-JFK(tn)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2463 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol Maier, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/16/2016) (tn)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2462 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Patricia Miller, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/16/2016) (tn)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2461 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gavan Thomson, on behalf of the Estate of Carlee Thomson, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Warner Chilcott Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC ("P&G), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against P&G are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/16/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-03813-JFK(tn)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2460 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sandra Bursey, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/1/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-00642-JFK(tn)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2459 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Roberta Levin & Morris Levin, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/1/2016) (tn)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2458 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Emma Nelson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/1/2016) (tn)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2457 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, MARILYN SAMBRANO and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp and Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own coasts and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/1/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07296-JFK(tn)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2456 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Anne Devito, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/29/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07988-JFK(tn)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2455 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Cheryl Kisla and Theodore Ted Kisla, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/25/2016) (tn)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2454 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Danah Carner, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/20/2016) (tn)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2453 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Esther Schmitt, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/20/2016) (tn)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2452 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol Dickinson and Howard R. Dickinson, her husband, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/20/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-09071-JFK(tn)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2451 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Leeann Finlay, individually and as Personal Representative for the Estate of Carolee Corley, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/20/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-06170-JFK(tn)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2450 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Teresa Etherton, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/20/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-05924-JFK(tn)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2449 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Connie M. Rivera, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/20/2016) (tn)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2448 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Rosela Meracle and William Osborne, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/11/2016) (tn)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2447 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Rosa Murawa, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiffs claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/5/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-06446-JFK(tn)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2446 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Lezlie Brown, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/5/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-02368-JFK(tn)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2445 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Bernadette Daigneault, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/5/2016) (tn)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2444 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carolyn J. Gilman, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (f01merly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/5/2016) (tn)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2443 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Elizabeth Klein & Harry Klein, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/5/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04157-JFK(mro)
January 5, 2016 Filing 2442 STIPULATION AND ORPER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Helen L. Jinks & Herman W. Jinks, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/5/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-00626-JFK(mro)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2441 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Margaret Heath, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/5/2016) (tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2440 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Yvonne Jordan and Randall Jordan, and the above-named Defendant, Merck & Co., Inc., (now known as Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as against Merck & Co, Inc. ONLY. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) (tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2439 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Teresa Hunyadi as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Hunyadi, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) (tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2438 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Dottie Valez, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) (lmb)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2437 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Myla Hawkins, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-00647-JFK(tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2436 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Victoria Green, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) (tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2435 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Margaret Wellman, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07133-JFK(tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2434 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Janet DeVivo, on behalf of the Estate of Mary Devivo, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-04107-JFK(tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2433 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Annette Gross and Fred R. Gross, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-01318-JFK(kko) Modified on 12/30/2015 (kko).
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2432 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Betty Bell Peace, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-03826-JFK(tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2431 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Richard L. Rhoden, Executor of the Estate of Gretchen Harrell, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04090-JFK(tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2430 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ann Hart, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Merck & Co., Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04091-JFK(kko)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2429 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Evelyn Sanders & Lewis Sanders, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) (tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2428 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Clarinda Hollis, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04092-JFK(kko)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2427 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Christine Schiller, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) (tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2426 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Debbie Stephens, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04099-JFK(tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2425 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Denielle Hone, on behalf of the Estate of Debra Land, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07813-JFK(kko)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2424 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joseph Tucker for the Est. of Mary E. Reutter, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-05486-JFK(tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2423 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Frank Wofford as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Agnes Wofford, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-08691-JFK(tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2422 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol Klotz, on behalf of the Estate of William Klotz, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Warner Chilcott Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC ("P&G), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against P&G are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07337-JFK(kko)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2421 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gwen Witten, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each pat1y is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-01017-JFK(tn)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2420 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Loyd Daniel Amerson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04084-JFK(tn)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2419 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above captioned case, Beryl Sedatol, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant, Warner Chilcott Sales (US) LLC, are not Dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-06810-JFK(tn)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2418 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, MARTHA LEE TRICE, Personal Representative of Martha Ingram Miller, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-00308-JFK(tn)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2417 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sylvia Ross-Epstein, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) (tn)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2416 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol Parker, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) (tn)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2415 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sherri Moore, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-03814-JFK(kko)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2414 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the Above-captioned case, Carol Keil, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-07867-JFK(kko)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2413 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, EVELYN JOHANNING, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-02373-JFK(kko)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2412 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Yuchiao Ho, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-07506-JFK(kko)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2411 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Amanda Crapenhoft, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) (kko)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2410 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Betty Case, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) (kko)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2409 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Marjorie Calhoun, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/1/2015) (kko)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2408 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Martha Clippinger & David Clippinger, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/18/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-08668-JFK(tn)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2407 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Clara Williams, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/18/2015) (tn)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2406 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Clarence R. Smith, Jr., personal representative for the Estate of Louise Smith and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/18/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-00650-JFK(tn)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2405 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Shirley Mae Scofield and Lee Raymond Scofield, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/18/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-08916-JFK(tn)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2404 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ian Newman, as Executor of the Estate of his late mother Barbara Davids, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/18/2015) (tn)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2403 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, April McMullins, as the Executor of the Estates of her late mother Mary Mathews and late father James Mathews, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/18/2015) (tn)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2402 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kay Thomas, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & co., Inc) ("Merck"), and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis") through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/18/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07804-JFK(tn)
November 17, 2015 Filing 2401 STIPULATION DISMISSING TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., BARR LABORATORIES, INC., AND BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC WITH PREJUDICE: Plaintiff Gary Lynn Overly, Sr., through his duly authorized counsel, hereby agrees and stipulates to the dismissal with prejudice and without fees or costs of all claims which were asserted or which could have been asserted by Plaintiff against Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., and Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC (incorrectly named in Plaintiffs' Complaint as "Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc.") in the above-captioned action, under the authority of Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-03702-JFK(tn)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2400 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 21 (Concerning Release of Common Benefit Funds) granting #2396 Motion to Authorize: that the PSC's Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Common Benefit Funds is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, the escrow agent, KCC Class Action Services, LLC, is hereby ordered to release the common benefit funds currently being held in escrow as follows: Because the total amount of the PSC litigation fund contributions, loans to the PSC by PSC member firms, and common benefit held costs exceed the total amount of the common benefit fund, the liabilities of the PSC shall be paid in full first by paying back 100% of the litigation fund contributions and retiring all loans to the PSC by PSC member firms at 100%. The remaining funds shall then be utilized to pay back held costs on a funds-available pro rata basis after the liabilities of the PSC are paid in full. The following amounts shall be utilized in determining litigation fund contributions, loans to the PSC by PSC member firms, and allowable held costs for common benefit work, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/16/2015) (tn)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2399 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, SANDRA HOLMAN, Personal Representative of Pauline Baskette, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/16/2015) (tn)
November 13, 2015 Filing 2398 DECLARATION of Timothy M. O'Brien in Support re: #2396 MOTION to Authorize Distribution of Common Benefit Funds Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Consent Motion for Distribution of Common Benefit Funds.. Document filed by PSC. (O'Brien, Timothy)
November 13, 2015 Filing 2397 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #2396 MOTION to Authorize Distribution of Common Benefit Funds Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Consent Motion for Distribution of Common Benefit Funds. . Document filed by PSC. (O'Brien, Timothy)
November 13, 2015 Filing 2396 MOTION to Authorize Distribution of Common Benefit Funds Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Consent Motion for Distribution of Common Benefit Funds. Document filed by PSC.(O'Brien, Timothy)
November 13, 2015 Filing 2395 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Consent Motion for Distribution of Common Benefit Funds. Document filed by PSC. (O'Brien, Timothy)
November 13, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John F. Keenan: Status Conference held on 11/13/2015. (wr)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2394 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Margaret McKay, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07057-JFK(tn)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2393 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Michael Chmiel as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Alberta Cooke, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/6/2015) (tn)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2392 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mattie Naumann, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-04182-JFK(tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2391 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. Ruth P. Morris (husband and wife), Merck & Co., Inc. and Edward A. Morris terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-01320-JFK(kko)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2390 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Jacqueline Phillips, Jerri Benton, Frankie Holland and Joey Gordon, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-04180-JFK(tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2389 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mattie B. Shiver, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-01280-JFK(tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2388 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Cheryl G. Sass, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05540-JFK(tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2387 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Caitrona Kenny, Executor of the Estate of Anne Kenny, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) (tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2386 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Vera Schuell, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-14241-JFK(tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2385 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Geraldine Guarino, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) (tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2384 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Stephen Goya, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"}, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-03296-JFK(tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2383 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara M. Gillen, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) (tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2382 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kathleen Atchinson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06954-JFK(tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2381 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Loretta Jean Dilbert and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) (tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2380 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, VICKI AVERIIT, as the Independent Executrix of the Succession of DAHLIA LEWIS, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-00641-JFK(tn)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2379 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ronald Sickler, on behalf of the Estate of Betty Lee Sickler, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-01760-JFK(tn)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2378 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Vincent C. Dwyer, III as Executor for the Estate of Nancy Dwyer, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2377 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Linda Welch, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Proctor & Gamble, Demanded Pharmaceuticals, and Aventis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) (rjm)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2376 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jeannine Barrell, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-04580-JFK (rjm)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2375 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Avron Wahl, on behalf of the Estate of Betty Wahl, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) (rjm)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2374 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara Vaughan, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04102-JFK(lmb)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2373 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Linda Turkisher, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-05521-JFK(tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2372 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Amelia Taylor, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07805-JFK(tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2371 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Judith Pflum, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Roche Laboratories, Inc. and Hoffmann-LaRoche, Inc., are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (a New Jersey corporation, One Merck Drive, Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889) terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05068-JFK(tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2370 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joy Rothberger, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-08654-JFK(tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2369 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, ETHEL O'KELLEY and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-11159-JFK(tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2368 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Annie Huffstetler, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) (tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2367 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gloria Jean Holderfield and David Holderfield, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) (tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2366 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol A. Hibbins, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each pm1y is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-00311-JFK(tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2365 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, James Douglas, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) (tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2364 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ulrike Dempsey, on behalf of Ed Dempsey, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-02143-JFK(tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2363 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09481-JFK(tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2362 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Susan Boswell, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) (tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2361 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Vivian Baker & James Baker, IIII, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) (tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2360 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kathleen Mazzucco, on behalf of the Estate or Ella Tristano, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09562-JFK(tn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2359 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jimmie Lynn Burt, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/30/2015) (tn)
October 19, 2015 ***DELETED DOCUMENT pursuant to instructions from Chambers on 10/21/2015. Deleted document number 2349 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2358 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Dolores Startt, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-06294-JFK(mro)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2357 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09481-JFK(kko) Modified on 10/20/2015 (kko). Modified on 10/22/2015 (kko).
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2356 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ana Trastoy, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04158-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2355 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kathyrn S. Redford, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-02953-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2354 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joseph Sargent, on behalf of the Estate of Clina Sargent, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-05086-JFK(kko)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2353 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Altagracia & Marcial Segura, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) (kko)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2352 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Anita Rattner, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-14236-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2351 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Donna Russo, on behalf of the Estate of Betty Schnelle, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Claims dismissed by stipulation dated 5/26/15. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-02864-JFK(kko)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2350 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Susan Preston, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Warner Chilcott Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC ("P&G"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against P&G are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal. Merck & Co., Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07276-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2348 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Martin Parkhurst, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04096-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2347 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Emily Northrup, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05487-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2346 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara Nielsen, on behalf of the Estate of Phyllis Stanton, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04085-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2345 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Nancy Naydeck, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-04831-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2344 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jacqueline A. Lee, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) (tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2343 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary T. Kennedy as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Emma Boles, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-11330-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2342 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Amy Johnston, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) (tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2341 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Linda F. Hennrich, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-02274-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2340 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Avril Evans, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-00979-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2339 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Dixie Duncan and Kenneth Duncan, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) (tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2338 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barry Dorfman, on behalf of the Estate of Lillian Dorfman, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-14184-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2337 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Doug Crary, personal representative of the Estate of Janice Crary, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-00645-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2336 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Elizabeth Brenseke, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-07429-JFK(tn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2335 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Dorothy Allen, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/19/2015) (tn)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2334 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, William Tappen, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/13/2015) (tn)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2333 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above captioned case, Mona DeLeonardis, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorney fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/8/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-08340-JFK(tn)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2332 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara DeCosta, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-02336-JFK(tn)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2331 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Thye Yew Ching, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06206-JFK(tn)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2330 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Donald R. Bevin, personal representative for the Estate of Nancy Earhart, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06953-JFK(tn)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2329 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Virginia Anderer, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04083-JFK(tn)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2328 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Nancy Bise Ramsey, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04086-JFK(tn)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2327 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Betty Mi1jan and Robert Miljan, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants SmithKline Beecham Corporation d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., and Roche Laboratories Inc., are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-05616-JFK(tn)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2324 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Patricia Kincaid, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/2/2015) (kko)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2321 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carolyn Jarrett, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/2/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04093-JFK(kko)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2317 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carolyn Patterson, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/2/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-09382-JFK(kko)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2326 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Herbert Kligerman, on behalf of the Estate of Irene Kligerman, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-05515-JFK(tn)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2325 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ramon L. Harrison, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-00365-JFK(tn)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2323 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Margaret Harth, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-00361-JFK(tn)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2322 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Bette Haley, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07342-JFK(tn)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2320 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jack Cuthbert, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-00387-JFK(tn)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2319 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in above-captioned case, WILMA L. CROSS, and the above named Defendant, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (formerly known as Merck & Co. Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-07543-JFK(tn)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2318 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Nike Brandiff, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-09737-JFK(tn)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2316 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Roy Johnson, on behalf of the Estate of Cheryl Henneken, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-14240-JFK(mro)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2315 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Angelarose Mione, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-02956-JFK(mro)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2314 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Philippe Adler, on behalf of the Estate of Marie-Rose Adler, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06250-JFK(mro)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2313 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jennifer Stewart Day, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-08074-JFK(mro)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2312 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ronald D. Hatton, Executor or the Estate of Lois Hatton, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novaris Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-01772-JFK(mro)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2311 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Theresa King, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-00672-JFK(mro)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2310 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara Burke, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04087-JFK (rjm)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2309 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Steven Fischer, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-00939-JFK(kko)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2308 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Patricia Howard, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-05922-JFK(tn)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2307 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Rita Luark as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joann Sinclair, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/29/2015) (rjm)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2306 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Martin Muckier, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07130-JFK(tn)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2305 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Judy Price, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07131-JFK (rjm)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2304 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Anthonia Ryan, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-05919-JFK(tn)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2303 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol Wright, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-09619-JFK(tn)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2302 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Betty Catt, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04088-JFK(tn)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2301 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Minda Converse, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-08070-JFK(tn)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2300 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ellen Anderson and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-03821-JFK(tn)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2299 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Adelfa Arriaga, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-08587-JFK(tn)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2298 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Robert Allen, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07704-JFK(tn)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2297 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Pauline Bianco, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/28/2015) (tn)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2296 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kenneth Davis, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-09742-JFK(tn)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2295 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ellen C. Marino as the Conservator of Mary Mihalak, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/28/2015) (tn)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2294 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jacqueline Vanderhoof, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/16/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06038-JFK(tn)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2293 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Rayford Yates Lee and Walter Michael Lee, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/16/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-03248-JFK(tn)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2292 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, LEONARD DONESON, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/16/2015) (tn)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2291 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Hope Daggett Davis, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Judith Hope Daggett and as attorney-in-fact for Willis Allen Daggett, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/16/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-03692-JFK(tn)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2290 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ruby Stratton, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/16/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-01452-JFK(tn)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2289 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Isabelita P. Azurin & German G. Azurin, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/16/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-00444-JFK(kko)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2288 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol Kowarski, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis") through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiffs' claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal but have instead been dismissed by the stipulation dated May 26, 2015. The application is granted. This order amends and supersedes the Court's order of the same date. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06212-JFK(tn)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2287 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Stacy Strong, on behalf of the Estate of Carol Strong, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis") through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiffs' claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal but have instead been dismissed by the stipulation dated May 4, 2015. The application is granted. This order amends and supersedes the Court's order of the same date. Stacy Strong (the personal representative of Carol Strong's estate) terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04100-JFK(tn)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2286 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gary Plasschaert on behalf of the Estate of Diane Plasschaert, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal, but have instead been dismissed by the stipulation dated May 26, 2015. The application is granted. This order amends and supersedes the Court's order of the same date. Gary Plasschaert (as the personal representative of this matter in place and instead of Diane Plasschaert) terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04097-JFK(tn)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2285 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Brian Hamilton, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal, but have instead been dismissed by the stipulation dated May 26, 2015. The application is granted. This order amends and supersedes the Court's order of the same date. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07278-JFK(tn) Modified on 9/14/2015 (tn).
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2284 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Steve Maya, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel that all or Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal have instead been dismissed by the stipulation dated May 26, 2015. The application is granted. This order amends and supersedes the Court's order of the same date. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-05519-JFK(tn) Modified on 9/14/2015 (tn).
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2283 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary Parker, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) (tn)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2282 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Irene Grundy, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Warner Chilcott Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC ("P&G"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against P&G are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal. Merck Sharp & Dohme Co. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-04828-JFK(tn)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2281 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary Ann McLendon, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Mary Ann McClendon terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-02287-JFK(tn) Modified on 9/15/2015 (tn).
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2280 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Phyllis Waguespack, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp and Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) (ama) Modified on 9/17/2015 (ama).
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2279 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE : It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Linda Metcalf and Ross Metcalf, w/h and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp and Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07299-JFK(ama) Modified on 9/17/2015 (ama).
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2278 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Steve Maya, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all or Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-05519-JFK(mro)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2277 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above captioned case, Vivian C. Wood, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel,that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-06981-JFK(ama)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2276 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Stacy Strong, on behalf of the Estate of Carol Strong, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) (kko)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2275 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above captioned case, Susan Feuerwerker and Anton Feuerwerker, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R.Civ.P.41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09882-JFK(ama)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2274 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ruth Baker and Leon Baker, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) (ama)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2273 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol Kowarski, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) (kko)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2272 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above captioned case, Margaret Williams, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07803-JFK(ama)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2271 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above- captioned case, Gary Plasschaert, on behalf of the Estate of Diane Plasschaert, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Plaintiff's claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04097-JFK(mro)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2270 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Isabelle G. Fish, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) (ama)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2269 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above captioned case, Janelle Gibson and James Gibson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-01295-JFK(ama)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2268 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above captioned case, Lora Jones, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-07807-JFK(ama)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2267 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joseph Lyons, on behalf of the Estate of Sandra Lyons, and the above-named Defendants. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation ("Novartis"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Novartis are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal. SO ORDERED. Merck & Co.,Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-03827-JFK(ajs)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2266 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jodie A. Prater and Ward Prater, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/31/2015) (tn)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2265 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary Lou Stephan, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/31/2015) (ama)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2264 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Warren Shepherd as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Betty R. Shepherd, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/31/2015) (ama)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2263 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Bonnie Yorke, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/31/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-05965-JFK(ama)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2262 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Catherine Spears, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through her respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each patty is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/31/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-04850-JFK(ama)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2261 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Betty Cannon-Rowley and Roland Rowley, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/31/2015) (ama)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2260 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Henry Johnston, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Henry Johnston terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/31/2015) (tn)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2259 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, LaVonna Briant, daughter and next friend of Rosalee Hust, deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-03455-JFK(kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2258 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Terrie J. Watkins, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-06328-JFK(kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2257 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Martha Tuskes, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-01454-JFK(kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2256 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Phyllis Virga, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-03554-JFK(kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2255 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Nancy L. McCormick, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-01163-JFK(kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2254 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Dorothy C. Resutek, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-06329-JFK(kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2253 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Abelina Cavazos, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) (kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2252 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Patsy M. Jones and Robert R. Jones, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) (kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2251 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ema Ayminski, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Proctor & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. Merck & Co., Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-01019-JFK(kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2250 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sheila Henry, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) (kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2249 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Tracy Turnwald as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Colleen Cervantes, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) (kko)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2248 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara G. Naum, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/21/2015) (kko)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2247 ORDER: Plaintiff did not comply with the Lone Pine order and has failed to show cause why her complaint should not be dismissed with prejudice for failing to comply with the Lone Pine order. Therefore, the Court dismisses prejudice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/20/2015) (kko)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2246 ORDER denying (162 in case 1:07-cv-05938-JFK) Motion to Dismiss, Notice of Motion of Defendant Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. To Dismiss With Prejudice For Failure to Comply With The Court's May 11, 2015 Order. Before the Court is Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claims for failing to enter a pro se appearance by a Court ordered deadline. Since Plaintiff has now entered a pro se appearance, (ECF No. 165.), the Court will excuse the delay. Defendant's motion is therefore denied. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/20/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-05938-JFK (kko) Modified on 8/21/2015 (kko).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2245 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Rosemary hoeft, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-00333-JFK(tn)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2244 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joan C. Mastropietro, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) (tn)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2243 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gaye Formanek, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-04908-JFK(mro)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2242 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Betty L. Conklin and Clair A. Conklin, Individually and as Husband and Wife, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-01496-JFK(mro)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2241 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Arlene Cobb, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-06225-JFK(mro) Modified on 8/14/2015 (mro).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2240 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, JEANNETTE SCHEURENBRAND, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-00625-JFK(mro)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2239 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, ROGER KRECHEL, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-07875-JFK(mro)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2238 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Darlene Geoghan, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff claims against Defendants Proctor & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, lnc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06950-JFK(ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2237 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captionccl case, ROBERT UHREY, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Feel. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-03936-JFK(mro)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2236 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Albertine Anderson, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff claims against Defendants Proctor & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-09214-JFK(ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2235 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, ETHEL WOODARD, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-02495-JFK(ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2234 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Juanita K. Hunter, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Sanofi-Aventis U.S. L.L.C. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-02036-JFK(ajs) Modified on 8/13/2015 (ajs).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2233 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Elaine M. Hill and Donald L. Hill, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-10438-JFK(mro)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2232 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kathleen Kingston-Mitchell, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-05920-JFK(ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2231 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sybil Mintz and Sidney Mintz, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) (mro)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2230 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Frances Lerblance, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-02371-JFK(ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2229 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Misty Nail as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jerry Nail, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04175-JFK(ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2228 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Lynn L. Kast, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-09616-JFK(mro)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2227 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, MARY ANN HAYNES, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-00604-JFK(ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2226 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Philip C. Hogan, Trustee of the Estate of Dorothy Hogan Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) (mro) Modified on 8/14/2015 (mro).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2225 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jane Nelson, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09333-JFK(ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2224 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Suzanne Oldenhof, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) (ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2223 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Thomas G. Reeck as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joyce Reeck, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) (ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2222 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, WILLIAM MAYFIELD AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY M. MAYFIELD, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-06174-JFK(mro) Modified on 8/13/2015 (mro). Modified on 8/14/2015 (mro).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2221 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, CLARETHA FOWLER, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-08537-JFK(ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2220 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary Cornell as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Robin Cornell, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04173-JFK(ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2219 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Patricia M. Coval, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05798-JFK(mro)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2218 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kwajalein White, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) (ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2217 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Liliane P. Tripp, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) (ajs)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2216 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Francine C. Koldoff, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel. that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff claims against Defendants Proctor & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 8/12/2015) (ajs)
August 11, 2015 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #1027 Case Management Plan in the amount of $200.00, paid on 8/11/2015, Receipt Number 465401132038. (moh)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2215 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Harriet Rice, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-01391-JFK(kko)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2214 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ora R. Carroll & Milton Carroll, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) (tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2213 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Evelyn Dorena Smith, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) (tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2212 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary Ruth Schwartz, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09819-JFK(tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2211 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary J. Morris, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff claims against Defendants Proctor & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. Merck & Co., Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) (tn) Modified on 8/4/2015 (tn).
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2210 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Effie L. Courtney and Joe Perry Courtney, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) (tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2209 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Catherine Williamson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) (tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2208 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Charlotte Millman as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Satlow, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) (tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2207 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Edward A. Wolff and Anna Lee Wolff, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04155-JFK(tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2206 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ramona Chavez, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04172-JFK(tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2205 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Velma Conner and Elton J. Conner, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) (tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2204 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Patricia DeVere and Gale V. DeVere, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) (tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2203 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol Fasolino, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09881-JFK (rjm)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2202 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in above-captioned case, JODIE LASTER, and the above named Defendants, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (formerly known as Merck & Co. Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-07800-JFK (rjm).
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2201 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gary Graham, surviving spouse of Jan is Graham, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07990-JFK(tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2200 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Rhonda Stanton, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) (tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2199 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sharon Gibson and Gerry Gibson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) (lmb)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2198 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Rosalia Amato and Tony Amato, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06113-JFK(tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2197 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joanne Ellis and Joseph Ellis, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) (lmb)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2196 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Betty Raines and Warren Raines, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) (lmb)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2195 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Oralia Ramos, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) (tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2194 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sharon Redford and Tom Redford, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.)("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07991-JFK(lmb)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2193 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carla Newland and Jeffrey Newland, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-01400-JFK(tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2192 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Paula R. Herken, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-01579-JFK(tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2191 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Shail V. Mehta, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04177-JFK(tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2190 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Helen J. Butterworth, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-10650-JFK(tn) Modified on 7/21/2015 (tn).
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2189 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Edith Mack, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) (tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2188 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs, in the above-captioned case, Dean Pappaterra and Christopher Pappaterra, co-personal representatives of the Estate of Patricia Pappaterra, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-01241-JFK(tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2187 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary Conway and Thomas Conway, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) (tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2186 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case. Judith S. Gold, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04880-JFK(tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2185 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case. Norma Benardette, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06955-JFK(tn)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2184 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Susan Shoemake, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-04836-JFK(kko)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2183 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ofelia Barretto & Ramon Barretto, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-07971-JFK(kko)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2182 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Wilma Smith, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-03710-JFK(kko)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2181 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kathryn B. Wallet, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-01875-JFK(kko)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2180 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Leonard B. Feld, Executor for the Estate of Ida Axelrod, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05855-JFK(kko)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2179 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kathy Brittain & Larry Brittain, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) (tn)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2178 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Barbara Welch dismisses this action, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-02812-JFK(tro)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2177 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Curtis Larson dismisses this action, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05485-JFK(tro)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2176 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carolyn Ann Allen, Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia A. Stevens, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) (tn)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2175 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Melody Pomerenke, dismisses this action, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-08940-JFK (tro)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2174 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kerma Lamkin & John Lamkin, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) (tn)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2173 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Linda B. MOskovics, Executor of the Estate of Lewis Fischbein, dismisses this action, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-04989-JFK(tro) Modified on 7/13/2015 (tro).
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2172 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Elaine Dockweiler dismisses this action, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-05181-JFK(tro)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2171 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Winifred Deyle dismisses this action, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-02250-JFK(tro)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2170 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Winifred Deyle, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merk"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-02250-JFK(tn)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2169 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Reyna Vandercar, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-11329-JFK(tn)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2168 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Marie W. Trower & William R. Trower dismiss this action, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-09528-JFK(tro)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2167 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Earl Crossman dismisses this action, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-03482-JFK(tro)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2166 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Charlotte A. Morris & Charles F. Morris, Jr. dismiss this action, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-05137-JFK(tro)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2165 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Susan J. Spellman, Executor of the Estate of Myrl T. Vandergriff, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) (tn)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2164 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carlos Salazar, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/06/2015) (ama)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2163 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara J. Sebok, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) (tn)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2162 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, CLYDE THOMAS RHYNE, Personal Representative of Margaret Rhyne, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-09460-JFK(tn)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2161 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Wanda L. Tucker, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Tucker, Deceased, and Mary Tucker, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) (tn)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2160 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Benzena Johnson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) (tn)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2159 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Vivian Zale and Robert Zale, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/06/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-05377-JFK(ama)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2158 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Norvell Caulley and Sally Ann Caulley, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/06/2015) (ama)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2157 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Geraldine Hanna, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) (tn)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2156 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joyce H. Klann and Wilbur G. Klann, her husband, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) (tn)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2155 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Julia Paulen and Richard Paulen, and the above-named defendant, Merck Sharp & Dolune Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-09643-JFK(tn)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2154 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sarah McPhail, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc., are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-01032-JFK(ajs)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2153 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Julia Glab and John D. Glab, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-06822-JFK(kl)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2152 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in above-captioned case, JUANITA PEARL GEBERIN, and the above named Defendant, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (formerly known as Merck & Co. Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-08748-JFK(ajs)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2151 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in above-captioned case, GENEVA TURNER, and the above named Defendant, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (formerly known as Merck & Co. Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-08752-JFK(ajs)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2150 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in above-captioned case, ESTHER L. POST, and the above named Defendant, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (formerly known as Merck & Co. Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-05613-JFK(ajs)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2149 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in above-captioned case, PATRICIA D. RENDINE AND JOSEPH RENDINE, and the above named Defendant, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (formerly known as Merck & Co. Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-08753-JFK(ajs)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2148 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Rose C. Bennett and James J. Bennett, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-03218-JFK(kl)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2123 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Janet Scott-Correira, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/24/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04174-JFK. (spo) Modified on 6/29/2015 (spo).
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2147 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Margie Ondreas, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2146 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Robert J. Miltenberger and Beatrice I. Miltenberger, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-10362-JFK(tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2145 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jacqueline E. Baltz and Louis J. Baltz, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (kko) Modified on 6/24/2015 (kko).
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2144 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Leah K. Hansell, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04176-JFK(tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2143 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Pauline Calabrese, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-09615-JFK. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (kl)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2142 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kelley Aldrich, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-04994-JFK(tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2141 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Marilyn Weisberg, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Glaxosmithkline and Roche Laboratories, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2140 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ruth Ann Malm, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (kko)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2139 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sandra Silverman and Jerry Silverman, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (kko) Modified on 6/24/2015 (kko).
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2138 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-05685-JFK(ajs)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2137 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Brenda W. Vincent and James H. Vincent, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (ajs) Modified on 6/24/2015 (ajs).
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2136 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joan Dorf and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-01246-JFK(tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2135 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Marie Lewis and George Lewis, her husband, and the above- named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (lmb)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2134 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Anna M. McLean, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-05669-JFK(kko)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2133 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, James P. Berger, Esq., Legal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Monis, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (kko)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2132 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ella Robertson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-04993-JFK(tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2131 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Adell Rejcek, personal representative of the Estate of Clement Rejcek, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-00649-JFK(tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2130 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Cathy Vasquez, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-11336-JFK(kko)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2129 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Nancy I. Thrift and Bobby Thrift, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-04200-JFK(tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2128 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, VERA MAE STOLT, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-07374-JFK-JCF(tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2127 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Rochelle Kenig and Marvin Jerry Kenig, her husband, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (kko)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2126 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joyce Prince, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-05005-JFK(tn)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2125 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Violet Shull, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (kko) Modified on 6/24/2015 (kko).
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2124 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Eusania Olivera, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (kko) Modified on 6/24/2015 (kko).
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2122 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Theresa Marcone, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-05174-JFK. (spo)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2121 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Henrietta Roginski, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05980-JFK. (spo)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2120 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, ADRIENNE CHRAPPA, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-03376-JFK. (spo)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2119 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Verma Hansford, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/23/2015) (spo)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2118 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09481-JFK(ama)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2117 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09481-JFK(tn)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2116 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sarah Jane Parlier and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-08396-JFK(tn)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2115 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Barbara Ann Pilla and Benedict Michael Pilla, III, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (tn)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2114 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Martin Smith and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-08108-JFK(lmb)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2113 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Donna Bizarro, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-01290-JFK(tn)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2112 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Elizabeth Basil and Anthony Frederick Basil, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly know as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (lmb)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2111 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Betty Denson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-01301-JFK(tn)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2110 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Shirley A. Heckman and George Heckman, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-06815-JFK(tn)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2109 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Imogene Turner and Ailor Turner, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each pa1iy to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (tn)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2108 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-05925-JFK(tn)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2107 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Beverly J. Johnson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-02219-JFK(kko)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2106 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Kathryn S. Burr and William T. Burr, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (ama)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2105 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Robert DeRostyne as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Cynthia Thibault, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (ama)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2104 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Lynda Cale, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (ama)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2103 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Joan Dickey, and Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-09118-JFK(kko)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2102 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Judy Gagnon and Rene Gagnon, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dolune Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (ama)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2101 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Equilla Edwards, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06952-JFK(ama)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2100 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Anne Forman, and Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-01694-JFK(kko)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2099 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Linda Dewald and Jack Dewald, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (ama)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2098 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and the above-named Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation, through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09481-JFK(ama)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2097 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Betty Sue Meyers n/k/a Betty Sue O'Pry, and Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4l(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (kko)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2096 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees otherwise determined by the Settlement Agreement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09479-JFK(kko)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2095 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, and Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09479-JFK (kko) Modified on 6/18/2015 (kko).
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2094 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Nina Huete, and Defendants, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") and McKesson Corporation through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-09479-JFK(kko)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2093 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Irene Delancey, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (ajs)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2092 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, TAMARIS REYES HERNANDEZ, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (ajs)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2091 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, CARMEN MARTINEZ AYALA, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (ajs)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2090 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Elvira McClain and C.D. McClain, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-08043-JFK(ajs)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2089 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Brenda Gregory and Larry Gregory, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/17/2015) (ajs)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2088 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara L. Morrison, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants, Roche Laboratories, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC and Proctor & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Smithkline Beechum Corporation, and Warner-Chilcott Pharmaceutical, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/9/2015) (spo)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2087 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Suzette Steinforth, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (f01merly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-07474-JFK(tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2086 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Margaret Sizelove, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-03459-JFK(tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2085 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carolyn Howell, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-06332-JFK(tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2084 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Rosalie Trifon, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-09618-JFK(tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2083 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gianna Pirri Ventura, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) (tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2082 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by arid between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jelena Camille Zednik, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) (tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2081 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Olga Wood, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-08110-JFK(tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2080 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara Cain, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) (tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2079 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Doris Wheeler, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-02154-JFK(tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2078 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Priscilla Taylor, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-02152-JFK(tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2077 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carol Ward, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Catherine Rush, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-10952-JFK(tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2076 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Alice M. Brown, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-00854-JFK(tn)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2075 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Dwaine R. Moore, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/05/2015) (ama)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2074 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Helen Ortiz, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/05/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-04174-JFK(ama)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2073 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Essie Small, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Cobalt Laboratories, Inc., and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/05/2015) (ama)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2072 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Evelene Goodrum, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/05/2015) (ama)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2071 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Betsy Price, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Glaxosmithkline and Roche Laboratories, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) (tn)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2070 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Aline Shipreck, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to fed, R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Glaxosmithkline and Roche Laboratories, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-03964-JFK(tn)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2069 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Louise E. Tomasiak, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Glaxosmithkline and Roche Laboratories, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. Merck & Co., Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) (tn)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2068 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Marie C. Bibeault, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Glaxosmithkline and Roche Laboratories, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. terminated. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05859-JFK(tn)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2067 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Selma Goldberg, and Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp, (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06820-JFK(tn)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2066 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, SHERRI BALLANCE, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ.P.41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-05937-JFK(tn)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2065 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Susan L. Sonfist, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) (tn)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2064 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Diane Ruh and Robert Ruh, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) (tn)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2063 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Victoria Miller, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-05393-JFK(tn)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2062 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Margot Chenault, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-02203-JFK(tn)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2061 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Anne Carballo, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-07087-JFK(kko)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2060 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Laura Wong, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06379-JFK(kko)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2059 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Peter S. Beckerman and Andrew D. Beckerman as Executors for the Estate of Blanche Beckerman, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05278-JFK(kko)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2058 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Amy H. Willis, Executor of the Estate of Barbara Halzel, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-05607-JFK(kko)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2057 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gary Lynn Overly, Sr., and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) (Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants, Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Sun Pharma Global, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-03702-JFK(ajs)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2056 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Juanita Wall, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-04062-JFK(kko)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2055 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Myra Allsopp and Ronald Allsopp, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) (Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA and Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-08308-JFK(ajs) Modified on 6/4/2015 (ajs).
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2054 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Robert Dunning and Marie Campion as Co-Trustees of Dorothy L. Dunning Living Trust, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) (kko)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2053 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, William C. Barr, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04143-JFK (spo)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2052 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Harriet Thowdis, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) (Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Glaxosmithkline and Roche Laboratories, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05979-JFK(ajs)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2051 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Audrey Ehrhardt, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4l(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) (spo)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2050 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above captioned case, Terry Kozlin and Roy Kozlin, Co-Personal Representatives of the Estate of Doris Kozlin, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/04/2015) (ama)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2049 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Phyllis J. Tester and Harold Tester, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/04/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04124-JFK(ama)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2048 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kimberly M. Robinson, individually, as next of kin of and as representative of the Estate of Doris J. Elliott, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) (spo) Modified on 6/8/2015 (spo).
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2047 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Tamae Porter and Howard Porter, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) (spo)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2046 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Linda Coffman, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) (Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that all of Plaintiff's claims against Merck are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Glaxosmithkline and Roche Laboratories, Inc. are not dismissed by this Stipulation of Dismissal and remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-05856-JFK(ajs)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2045 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Sheliah M. Mulvaney and Thomas J. Mulvaney, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/04/2015) (ama)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2044 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Donald Kirkpatrick, individually, as next of kin and as Representative of the Estate of Agnes Kirkpatrick, deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-06126-JFK (spo) Modified on 6/8/2015 (spo).
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2043 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above captioned case, Betty Martin, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/04/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-02539-JFK(ama)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2042 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara Murphy, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/04/2015) (ama)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2041 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gail Ann Howell, Executrix for the Estate of Clara C. Howell, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) (spo)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2040 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary Oznoff, and the above-named Defendant. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck") through their respective undersigned counsel that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/04/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-07440-JFK(ama)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2039 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Virginia Bergeson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-09454-JFK(spo)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2038 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ana Montes De Oca, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/04/2015) (ama)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2037 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: By and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Betty Carin Morgan, as representative of the Estate of Lonnie Morgan, deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4l(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-06742-JFK (spo)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2036 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Betty K. Miller & Donald A. Miller, Sr., and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/04/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-02046-JFK(ama)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2035 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Linda Anderson and Mike Perry Anderson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-08041-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2034 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Myrna Ott and Robert Eugene Ott, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2033 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Frank Hutcheson as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Elyene Underwood, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2032 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Patricia Powell, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2031 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Janet Gay Holliday, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (ajs)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2030 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Elizabeth Cole and Hubert Cole, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (ajs)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2029 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Cathy Fink & James Fink, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2028 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Jessie E. Cook & Thomas L. Cook, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-03857-JFK(ajs)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2027 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Cynthia Taylor Anderson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:06-cv-13542-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2026 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Catherine Biles Carter and Percy Carter, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 05/28/2015) (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2025 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Roberta O'Dea and Thomas O'Dea, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-01900-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2024 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mary Ruth Burgess, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:07-cv-10361-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2023 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Donald Langan, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2022 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Obdulia S. Fernandez, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2021 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Barbara Cryderman, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2020 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Isabel Loscalzo, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-00037-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2019 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Ronald Radtke, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (ama)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2018 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Deborah Bunten, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 08-cv-9956-JFK (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2017 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Thomas Clinton, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (ama)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2016 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Rebecca Shorter and Garry Shorter, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 08-cv-11251, 06-md-1789(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2015 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Robin J. Tarr, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (ama)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2014 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mei-Hua Chiu, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (ama)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2013 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Christine A. Bishop, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04154-JFK(ama)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2012 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Edith M. Brown & Curtis W. Brown, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-04159-JFK(ama)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2011 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kathleen Slotter as the Personal Representative of the Estate of LaRue K. Slotter, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (ama)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2010 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case, Billie Joyce Nobles and Jesse Nobles, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-00031-JFK(ama)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2009 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mardell Larcen and Ronald Meserve, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:12-cv-07798-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2008 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sharyn Turner, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:13-cv-05916-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2007 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Susan J. Hanson & Scott B. Hanson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-05148-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2006 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Margaret Taske, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-08257-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2005 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Yvonne Blake and Melvin Blake, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2004 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Carolyn McMahon, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-09375-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2003 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Gene P. Barnett, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2002 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, John Butler, Personal Representative of the Estate of Myrtle Butler, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 07cv06756 (kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2001 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Peggy Einnehmer, Successor of the Estate of Leona Einnehmer, Deceased, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:10-cv-06745-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2000 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Kathleen Townsend, individually, as next of kin of and as representative of the Estate of Dolores McQuade, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-01075-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1999 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Lillian R. Swann, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:09-cv-10303-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1998 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Virginia Burnette, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:08-cv-01550-JFK(kko)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1997 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Susan Kalouris, Executor of the Estate of Donald E. Fetty, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01789-JFK-JCF, 1:11-cv-01415-JFK(kko)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1971 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Mark A. Shafer, Executor of the Estate of Sharon L. Holdridge, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4l(a). Each pa11y is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/26/2015) (spo)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1996 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Joan L. Orowson, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.41 (a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/26/2015) (ama)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1995 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff in the above-captioned case, Sharon L. Valentine, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as Merck & Co., Inc.) ("Merck"), through their respective undersigned counsel, that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/26/2015) (ama)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1994 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff the above-captioned case, Avis Weeks, and the above-named Defendant, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (formerly known as M