In Re: Novartis Wage and Hour Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Patrick J. Toan, Kaila Jo Kirbach, Jonathan Gilman Sanders, Barbara Hartlander, Jill Ann Spagnoli, Stephen Bradshaw Picklesimer, John Brice Stewart, JoAnna Marie Dunning, James Allen Marshall, Kevin Lawrence Woodcock, Danida Sotarovska, Chriscelle Queen Merquillo, Nicholas Robert Stiglich, Riley Erin Reid, AnnaKay R. Monaco, Exie Ramona Riley, Karen Lee Smith, Kathleen Beauchamp Logan, Gerald David Oehlbert, Jeffrey R. Nolan, Donald A. Dunn, Brooke Studley, Sarah Sutton Eager, Maurie Christopher Tayor, Paige Allison Murtagh, James Michael Sislow, Samuel Howard Ehrlich, Andra Bloom Wildstein, Gregory Hanson, Carolyn Basilone, Jerry F. Wheeler, Ross Michael Berman, Dawn M. Monachino, Amy Ellsworth, Carmen Wilson, Heather Lee (Barstad) Lindaman, Robin Beth Johnson, Adena Reidy, Thomas Patrick Tafelsky, Scott David Trapp, Steven Enloid Gwin, Cheryl R. Woodruff, Neal Thomas Wetmore, Claudia J. Heunis, Lisa Joan Wright, Timothy Wayne Rinker, Marybeth K. Condon, Scott Matthew Druhot, Christopher Wayne Kinder, Tina Louise Bates, Kyle Fletcher Chasteen, Angela C. Reppert, Alissa Hope Merrill, Raymond Michael Zamloot, Lisa A. Oepkes, Sharon J. Brown-Burns, Robert E. Martin, Kristin Dawn Carr, Dina Lynn Langhorne, Jay Kevin York, Timothy Reginald Collins, Michael Robert Alexander, Valerie R. Luczak, Wiah Theodore Dogbeh, Michael V. Dalton, Jr., Jason Thomas Navarre, Brian Robert Tees, Mike Glen Morrison, James Bernard Ryberg, William Joseph Silverstrim, Maleia Patricia James, Davina Kullar, Preston M. Healy, Mark Gavin McMonigle, Janet Clifford, Jolleen L. Farge, Stephen William Lundquist, Heather Lynn Falzetta, Anthony William Gage, Bobby Wayne Wallis, Melanie Liberatore, Lisa Marie Herren, Angela Dalia Plonczyk, Alisa Ekdeshman, Jocelyn Elizabeth Lawson, Kristen S. Fouts, Robert William Wagner, Amy Rochelle Dickaw, Neal G. Hall, Gina R. Lee, Steven D. Nero, Tara Dalabakis, Elane G. Thomas, Sandra E. Hickey Pierce, Natalie Amaya, Brian W. Bunkelman, David John Pacic, Anthony P. Stano, Terri Lynn Roseborough, David Thomas Kilpatrick, Timothy Lamar Carter, Jeffrey Scott Wells, Carol Ann Livingston, Lisa Marie Clausen, Rodney Pierre Morris, Angela Christine Thoreson, Manan Reese, Barbara Callahan Reid, Jolie Marisa Conklin, Shelley Jeanine Saunders, Tina Marie Bernard, Jaime Pantoja, Pamela Jean Nelson, Michael T. Burke, James L. Piscitelli, Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer, Stephanie Lai, Michelle Marlene Latham, Beth Anne Eggleston, Robert J. Lynett, Susan Lee Rican, Brett Andrew Durham, Joshua Stephen Bender, Natalie Benz, Linda Miglieri, Cynthia Lewis Robertson, Chris Kakavas, Jane E. Luby, Geraldine Dominic, Alan Thomas Smith, Gary Joseph Summers, Kelly T. Bentsen, Peter Martin Comeau, Jana H. LaPorte, John G. Sin, Charlotte Michelle Chapman, Elizabeth K. Kelso, Tracey Lynn Napier-Linle, Karla Eppley Lindeen, Robin Riddick, Helga Nemaric, Simona Maria Lopes, Christopher James Rosso, Tara Nicole Hartman, Mark David Stahler, Dean Michael Fenton, Paul Manfredini, Todd S. Bell, Dale Michael Hrovat, Kristen Renee Millar, Anne M. Drayton, David Christopher Lapine, Jean Conover Tarantino, Bill Harl Osborn, John F. McGraw, Demetrio Amador, Minel Hider Tobertga, Edward F. Staats, Jr., John R. Theisen, Nikki Lynn Gresling, Tiffany Ann Gates, Joe Harold Woods, Tony Nick Yaremcho, Frank J. Perroni, Cynthia Ann Reeves, Deborah Lampe Chandler, Eva Delores Robinson, Elizabeth Ann Romain, Barbara Markowitz, Julie Ann Stecher, Julie H. Wakefield, Tasha Marie Andvesen, Rebecca Dawn Reese, Carol Suzzane (Sharp) Fisher, Glenn Edward Feroli, Jill Megan Sylvain, Andre Joel Daniel, John Erwin Anderson, Kyla West Brimberry, Karen Sue Lottes, Shawn Garrick, Chad Douglas Horne, Kurt R. Finley, Michael Kelly, Maureen Claire Barshinger, Casie Lea Akerberg, Brent J. Concklin, Robert Harold Robinson, Jerome Polinar, Jeffrey M. DeSantes, William Troy Luginbill, Reginald D. Scurlock, John Richard Saenz, Brooke R. Johnson, Jerrod W. Maloy, Donald Richard Galmines, Paul David Cordecca, Donna D. Loughrige-Bergamo, Nestor G. Lubowicz, James John McNeil, Bryna G. Chalef, Alesia Rachelle Bell, Kenneth Jeffrey Burson, Christy Marie Webb, Jennifer W. Donley, Susanne Marie Wickland, Tina Marie Rowden, Mark Edward Angel, Michelle C. Chalupka, Scott J. Larkin, Tamara (Inselstein) Stein, Sherry Leigh Bentson, John Norris, Jennifer P. Klearman, Steven Douglas Copeland, Sharon Ann (Pearlstein) Mair, Kimberly J. Stewart, Daniella Cristina Deseta, Santhre Murray Wood, Michelle Rhonda Wright, Robert Ekstrand, Christina Marie Sports, Jennifer Serles Van Fleet, Nicholas Jerome Snyder, Melanie Hays, Shelly B. Pens, Sonja Renee Underwood, Nikki Brown Short, Judy E. Montoya, Harold David Jack, Neha Ankoor Naik, Kathy Ann Belfiore, Michael Patrick Cronin, Thomas James Shannon, Ronald Melvin Bedford, Jr., Thomas Edward Wills, Jennifer A. Tate, William Richard Gelbuda, Heather D'Ann Kerns, Kassi Kris Smith, Penni Lynn Zelinkoff, Natalie Trubetsky, Jeffrey W. Gardiner, Colleen M. Tanner, Jeanna Dampier, Autumn Dawn Theisen, Stephen Frank Byler, Christopher M. Harding, Tajinder Singh Kalsi, Jeff Michael Prall, Matthew J. Sara, Amy Marie Gutwald, DeEttra Faye Crockett, Holly Marie Hummel, Susan Shephard Reed, Megan C. Flood, Thomas Pepe, Annie Evelyn Bennett, Rachel A. Thompson, Simona Lopes, Daryl Clark Ranton, Zachery P. Britton, Kevin Anthony Crofts, Gray-Paul Bossi, Melanie D. Christian, Kelly More Covington, Sherri Layne Sheffield, James Edward Nannly, Karen Rita Tomory, Clemente Ortiz Diaz, Kara Baril, Sarah Ann (Behrmann) Courtright, Korey Kane Freels, Joseph John Villoria, Gina M. Engelke, Kim Ann Godfrey, Valerie M. Ackerman, Charles Hugh Swicord, Jr., David N. Johnson, Maxiam Gerald Deaw, Roxanne E. Eadie, Kevin C. Koran, Tanya Larsen, Oscar Alfonso Valdivia, Amy Defranze, Emily Chestnut High, Marc L. Volland, Debora Kay Meyer, Kevin M. Gause, Brooks Morey, Juan C. Arteaga, Heather M. Hiott, Bruce Gary Kushner, Kimberly C. Elliot, Robert Louis Lampkins, Sheree Williams, Stephanie Carbol Weeks, Joan Janky, Raj Kumar Grandhi, Dawn Azar Barth, Catherine White, Annette M. Allen, Elmer Quaal Carlson, Catherine Elizabeth White, Luls Alfonso Meneses Jr., Terry Dale Crosslin, Kathryn Ann Michelic, Vicki Lyn Joslyn, Richard Arthur Marini, Anthony Maistros, Elizabeth Jean Chaudoir, Andrew Felz, Darrick Marc Chinn, Leonard J. Weaver, Diane Dootz Buckland, Roberto Lopez, Garva Tso SooHoo, Mary A. Barba, Brian Waselus, Sharon R. Plonka, Eva Marie Winger, Charles Michael Calvert, Stephen Anthony Alberson, Robert Anthony DiCocco, Michael Ian Cheifer, Matthew L. Thoreson, Kirsten Alexis Bone, Sherne Elaine Sandoval, Patrick J. Szyska, Jessica Sue Mazzarese, Malcolm M. Barrow, JoAnne Katherine Lindner, Nicole R. Pasternak, John Edwin McNutty, Jr., Angela Lee Hill, Mercedes Garcia, Grady Lee Williams, Valerie Duana True, Adam V. Izzo, Maureen Maria Farmer, Rich Polarek, Maureen Patricia Allen, Michael Steven Massello, Barbara A. Barnett, Lynn Marie Collado, Richard David Hahn, Traci Ann Wickham, Curtis M. Lagassa, Susan E. Malkan, Robert DeMarco Hartshorn, John Edward Heintschel, Jeffrey L. Reed, Tina Anne Koval, Donna M. Connally, Wendy Lynn Kirk, Jennifer Abend Ward, Mariana C. Gonzalez, Daniel D. Weaver, Zoya Shukhat, Deborah D. Davis, Fred C. Sliney, Jr., Robin Mark Oster, Krista A. Figular, Ranji Nicol Singh, Christine R. (Farr) Macarelli, Samira Saha, Brandon Robert O'Neill, John Michael Teflt, Oren Charles Hilty, Anny Fernandez-ZeGaya, Christine L. Mills, Trent Savage, Eduardo G. Montilla, William Ross Harrison, Vanessa R. Stanford, Lauren Price, Melinda Denise Ruff, Damon W. Bradley, Marla Beth (Herman) Venyise, Paul Russell Welch, Joshua Ransom Dickerson, Scott A. Hardy, Cynthia Lynch, Donna W. Pettipas, Katherine M. Taylor, Jacqueline Gail Wilheff, Chris A. Bittner, Kirk James Tidwell, Stephen Michael Hawthorne, Christopher Lawrence Dooley, Paul Michael Naeser, Rene Chestnut, Crystal Dawn Massey, Valerie J. Bobry, Jennifer L. Peldiak, Michele Marie Ferrier, Cynthia A. Foletta, James A. Schmidt, Debra Shirlene Benbow, William H. Smith, Scott H. Turner, Judith Shelton, Sally P. Davies, Schearon Stewart, Bryan Eric Sackmann, Philip J. Meyer, Robert George Cote, Stanley G. Gardner, Malia Alicia Hansen, Jill A. Phelan, Brian P. Estock, Devin M. Neves, Lisy Janice Devin, Jean A. Kerr, Cynthia Kay Malowitz, Ann Marie Frenn, Ralph H. Herz, Geoffrey Alan Williams, Scott A. Lawlor, Toinetta N. Walker, Marisa A. Duenas, Ronni Yvonne Reiburn-Jaross, Terry Thomas, Tracie Michelle Jones, Thomas Gregory Martin, Dao D. Truong, Carla Camille Spadafora, LaVictor Antwain Lipscomb, Jr., Stephanie L. Ducker, Denise Botta (Festa), Jay Patrick Fisher, Timothy Michael Leonard, Chakravartee Motriam, Robert James Burnell, Stacy Shelton Hale, Roxanne Moray, Connie R. Salyer, Sharon Neihu, Suellen Bowe, Jared Alan Ritter, Nancy Craig Brice, Chad C. Hazen, William Jeffrey Hoeksema, Thomas Christian McDonough, Steven Charles Savoia, Karen A. Saucier-Renner, Danielle Wood, Monique M. Vaughn, LeeAnn Olson Nielson, Lynn D. (Labbadia) Kirby, Lisa Renee Buck, Bridgette Horton, Pamela Kaye Houston, Georgiana Marie Claycomb, Mindy Suzanne Rousseau, Mark Francis Borrelli, Stephanie S. Fowler, Randy L. Everett, Wayne Brian Paul, Townes Walters Denemark, Tracey Clark Haynes-Parker, John Marcus Claycomb, Allison Lane Kay, Jade Thorne Meagher, Armando Saavedra, Lindy A. Morgan-Dickey, Donald Eugene Carroll Jr., Terri Jo Schlink, Mary Lee Hughes Moore, Oscar James McCoy, Toby A. Ducote, Randy M. Gubler, Christin Rene Robinson, Bobbie Ann Fulton, Paul Anthony Navarro, Carol Bollinger, Patrick John Couture, Darryl Copeland, Michael Christopher Contreras, Molly Mcvey, Norman L. Haynes, T.J. Blandford, Ronald S. Ruel, G. Kelly Robin, Cassandra H. Hodges, Anthony Worth Analla, Chatammour L. Henderson, Ryan E. Morrhart, April Jennifer Amoroso, Patti Dianne Queen-Lora, Salvatore A. Esposito, David Joseph Reese, Vanessa Lynn Girnus, Barbara A. Ziols, Jeffrey C. Harrington, Allan Brandon Jones, Greg DiPietro, Steven Edward Adams, Lynda Joan Muchow, Mark Richard Stueckrath, Lori P. Horton, Leesa M. Bond, Shawn Raphael Seliber, Frank G. Hidalgo, Trudy Lee Wendelin, Matthew Allen Phillips, Marshall Keith Biddlecome, Kelli Ann Mahoney, Daniel T. Hoffman, Daina Brown Riley, Jan Marie Ferriola, Thomas B. Kosola, Gordon Roy Gerttula, Cathy J. Hawkes, Shana Marie Simones, Michael Orlando Collier, David Harold Morden, Lorraine Andrews Edwards, Lindsay Sawyer, Lisa Hudson Durham, Vasma B. D. Stringer, Bryan Scott Becker, Julie Gibson, Joel Andrew Dawiczyk, Anthony Raineri, Chris M. Harris, Theresa A. Castro, Marc E. Hileman, Aleta M. Conti, Jeffrey M. Sabbe, Miles Graham Meister, Kimberly Susan Ohanian, Felicia Nicole Jordan, Sylvia Mand, Jonathan A. Albert, Callie M. McPherson, Shari Tina Greene-Goldberg, Harvey Miller, Jennifer Howard Johnson, Kya Supreme Bradley, Emily Ann Jacobsen, Korrie C. Foley, Amy Elizabeth Fabri, Charles J. Dooley, Janet Ashenden, Dominic Properzio Lattanzi, Patrick Brian Semenie, Anne-Marie Meeks, Richard C. Powers, Julia Karen Koludziejczyk, Stacia Salis-Green, Cynthia Darlene Michaelis, Paul A. O'Callaghan, Jennifer Raines Eby, Rosemarie Cistone (Sate), William Arthur Harris, Sheila Pauline Gregoire, Kim S. Yu, John C. Moncure, Sarah Carlson Arens, Kristie Lynn Brown, Juan Gabriel Paredes, Christina Marie Running, Kimberly Dawn Rees, Katherine C. Tebbe, Jerald L. Bjork, Douglas Clinton Hickok, Stephenie Danielle LaGrossa, Michael R. Kozin, Fariba Parniani, Sherri E. Donlan, Carolyn H. Eads, Susan Frustillo, Bertha Gomez, Melissa Dawn Engle, Raymond Gordon Watkins, Vickie Marie Self, David Wayne Parker, Leslie Lorraine Homa, Hestia Jareta Oliveros, Edward Mark Blanchon, Jana Eileen Zimmer, Thomas Edward Rudy, Martica Wilson, Jennifer Louise Haller-Oliver, Michael Todd Allen, Yvette A. Dearion, Virginia Grayson Gesler, Richard Howard Sulak, David P. Hart, Jane Elizabeth Burich, Nicole Marie Gazzo, Joseph F. Dunn, Theresa Louisa Thomas, Willie Vicente, Anna Maria Quintiliani, Kimberly Gildart Bladgett, John Phillip Rubin, Christopher Michael DeSantis, Ricardo C. Forges, Amy Grace Kjellesnik, Sally Oguzhan, Sandra K. Kantorak, Bryon Anthony Coston, Judith Anne Rychcik, Karlee Ann Sandell, Perryn Todd Daher, Kurt Mittendorf, Lori J. Eaton, Stefanie Cora Mullins-Krupp, Marni D. Harrington, John A. Imoriaco, Jason Alan Davis, Norman Preston Vallade, Rosa D. Madueno, Cheryl D. Fingers-Li, Jane Marie Hall, Todd Michael Norton, Nicole Louise Lynch, Patrick James Kiley, Bruce J. Maher, Audrey R. Barone, Sonya Richelle Luciotti, James P. Marino, Pollyanna Gail McKinnisk, Kevin Lawrence Rodgers, Karen M. McConnell, Michael F. Cerimele, Jr., Curtis Moore, Christopher Cyril Wald, Roshini Epasinghe, Elissa Ritt, Noelle Nicole Garcia, Lisa Michelle Pohl, Cherlee Dawn Street, William Thomas Orr, Kathryn Lee Ann Dover, Harry Fay West, Luann Hendren, Kimberly Renee Theobald, Amaury J. Santiago, Gary L. Harrison, Michael Erwin Meitzenheimer, Lenwood Christopher Jung, Janine Colletta, Jeffery Famu Gibson, James E. Burton Jr., Willie Joe Sturdiyant, Richard Victor Granger, James T. Weyand, Deborah Lynch Kuklis, Frank R. Hausenfluck, Thomas David Ramsey, Demetra K-M Hutchinson, Angel Allen Jefferson, Anthony Lee Hayes, Michael Lee Ward, Shannon R. Sturtevant, Pietrina M. Mannino, Robert Massaro, Jr., Susan A. Perry, Maribel B. Zisch, Roger P. Strachota, David Paul Clark, Robert B. Baulesh, Christopher David Lichok, Marina Gavilow, Lawrence Griller, Christine Vaughn, Heather Ann Beard-Noonan, Wilbert A. Ramos, Randy W. Balliett, Abelardo Rodriguez, Donald E. Duritsch, Kevin Matthew Fox, Sergio Pavon, Laura Beth Steiner, Latrese Williams, Jennifer Marie Ellard, Charles W. Budt, Cheri Lynn Waddell-Zornes, Maryann Abrishamcar, Marcus Allen Jordan, Margaret J. Pruter, Lori Beth Schlaifer, Joseph A. Cabrera, David McDonald, Amy Jean Velez, Janelle Gina Villopoto, Steven Torres, Krista Lee Burkeen, Julie Ane Lynch, Duane H. Dittner, Shannon T. Reynolds, Christine Marie Kautzman, Jennifer Leigh Rowland, Christi Sirmans, Christopher Z. Kennedy, Celena Brooke Banks, Patrick B. Cunningham, Cesare Laino and Joanna E. Bang
Defendant: Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Novartis Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2006md01794
Filed: October 31, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2012 Filing 219 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
July 18, 2012 Filing 218 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
June 28, 2012 Filing 217 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
June 28, 2012 Filing 216 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
May 31, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Final Fairness Hearing held on 5/31/2012. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Steve Greenblum) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF MARIAN ANNE WALDMANN, ESQ. Upon consideration of the request to withdraw by Marian Anne Waldmann, Esq., this Court orders that Marian Anne Waldmann, Esq. be withdrawn from this case, and further orders that Ms. Waldmann be removed from the Court's electronic service list. Attorney Marian Anne Waldmann terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/31/2012) (rjm)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT Approving Class Action Settlement and dismissing with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 05/31/2012) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt)
May 31, 2012 Calendar Entry **COURTROOM NOTIFICATION**: The Final Fairness Hearing will take place before Judge Crotty in Courtroom 20-C on Thursday, May 31, 2012 at 10:00 AM (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
May 30, 2012 Filing 213 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
May 30, 2012 Filing 212 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
May 21, 2012 Filing 211 NOTICE of Declaration of Stacy L. Roe in Support of the Parties' Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Class and Final Approval of Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Service Payments re: (208 in 1:06-md-01794-PAC) Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Sanford, David)
May 21, 2012 Filing 210 NOTICE of Declaration of David W. Sanford, Jeremy Heisler and Katherine M. Kimpel in Support of the Parties' Joint Motion for Final Certification of Settlement Class and Final Approval of Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Service Payments re: (208 in 1:06-md-01794-PAC) Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Sanford, David)
May 21, 2012 Filing 209 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of the Parties' Joint Motion for Final Approval of Certification of Settlement Class and Final Approval of Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Service Payments re: (208 in 1:06-md-01794-PAC) Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C, #4 D, #5 E, #6 F, #7 G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Sanford, David)
May 21, 2012 Filing 208 NOTICE of Joint Motion for Final Certification of Settlement Class and Final Approval of Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Service Payments. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Sanford, David)
May 21, 2012 Filing 207 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
May 21, 2012 Filing 206 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
May 15, 2012 Filing 205 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
May 15, 2012 Filing 204 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
May 15, 2012 Filing 203 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
May 15, 2012 Filing 202 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
May 15, 2012 Filing 201 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
May 15, 2012 Filing 200 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
May 15, 2012 Filing 199 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
May 9, 2012 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #200 Notice of Filing of Transcript. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
May 9, 2012 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #199 Transcript. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
April 23, 2012 Filing 198 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 23, 2012 Filing 197 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 23, 2012 Filing 196 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 23, 2012 Filing 195 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 23, 2012 Filing 194 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 23, 2012 Filing 193 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 23, 2012 Filing 192 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
April 17, 2012 Filing 191 Letter addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michelle Stahl haney dated 4/13/2012 re: Michelle Haney writes to request that she be allowed to opt in and should be included in the class. (ft)
April 16, 2012 Filing 190 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 16, 2012 Filing 189 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 16, 2012 Filing 188 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 16, 2012 Filing 187 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 16, 2012 Filing 186 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 16, 2012 Filing 185 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
April 6, 2012 Filing 184 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 6, 2012 Filing 183 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 6, 2012 Filing 182 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 6, 2012 Filing 181 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 6, 2012 Filing 180 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 179 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 178 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 177 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 176 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 175 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 174 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 173 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 172 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 171 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 170 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 169 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 168 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 167 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 166 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 165 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 164 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 163 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 162 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 161 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 160 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 159 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 158 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 157 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 156 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 155 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 154 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 153 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White.(Sanford, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 152 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine Elizabeth White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: Class Counsel shall fIle a "Notice of Filing." Class Counsel shall attach a list of opt-ins' names to the Notice as "Exhibit A." Immediately after filing the Notice, Class Counsel shall file all corresponding Opt-In and Release forms under the filing event "Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Under the F.L.S.A." Class Counsel shall file the forms in appropriately-sized batches such that the Court's electronic filing system can accept each electronic document. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/23/2012) (cd)
March 22, 2012 Filing 150 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/24/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2012 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 1/24/2012 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 6, 2012 Filing 148 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/24/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 6, 2012 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 1/24/2012 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER PRELIMINARY APPROVING SETTLEMENT: The Court preliminarily approves the Settlement Agreement as being fair, reasonable and adequate, subject to the right of Class Members to challenge the fairness, reasonableness or adequacy of the Settlement Agreement and to show cause, if any exists, why a final judgment dismissing this case and all released claims and awarding attorneys' fees and expenses to Class Counsel, should not be entered following a Final Fairness Hearing, as further set forth within. The Court appoints as Class Counsel, David Sanford, Esq., Jeremy Heisler, Esq. Katherine M. Kimpel, Esq., and Grant Morris, Esq., of Counsel, of SANFORD WITTELS & HEISLER, LLP to represent the Settlement Class for purposes of the Settlement. Final Fairness Hearing is set for 5/31/2012 at the United States Courthouse, at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Crotty. As of the date hereof, all proceedings in this case are stayed until further order of this Court, except as may be necessary to implement the Settlement Agreement. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/25/2012) (ab)
January 25, 2012 Filing 145 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Sanford, David)
January 25, 2012 Filing 144 NOTICE of Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval re: (143 in 1:06-md-01794-PAC) Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Sanford, David)
January 25, 2012 Filing 143 NOTICE of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Document filed by Simona Lopes, Minel Hider Tobertga, Catherine White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Sanford, David)
January 24, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 1/24/2012. REMARK: The Court preliminarily approved the proposed settlement (99 million dollars and up to 30% on attorneys fees). The court will "so order" the proposed stipulation and order preliminarily approving the proposed settlement upon receipt on Wednesday, January 25, 2012. The Final Settlement Approval Hearing set for Thursday, May 31, 2012 at 10:00 AM. See transcript for complete details. Court Reporter: Ann Hairston. (mov)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL granting #141 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Vedder Price PC is allowed to to withdraw as counsel for NPC and the law firm of Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP is substituted as lead counsel, and the law firm of Kaye Scholer LLP is added as counsel, for NPC. Attorney Jonathan Alan Wexler terminated; granting #141 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jonathan Alan Wexler terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/14/11) (cd)
March 10, 2011 Filing 141 MOTION for Vedder Price P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney of record of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation., MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Richard H. Schnadig, Sara Jeanine Kagay, New Attorney: Evan R. Chesler, Darin P. McAtee Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McAtee, Darin)
March 1, 2011 Filing 140 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 09-0437-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is VACATED and the case is REMANDED for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 03/01/2011. (nd)
March 1, 2011 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #140 USCA Mandate,. (nd)
November 3, 2010 Filing 139 Costs Taxed USCA Case Number 09-0437-cv. in the amount of $11,722.60. Docketed as Judgment #10,1927 on 11/4/2010 in favor of Appellants Simona Lopes et al. (nd)
July 6, 2010 Filing 138 TRUE COPY OPINION of USCA as to #135 Amended Notice of Appeal, #134 Notice of Appeal filed by Shana Marie Simones, Thomas Christian McDonough, Nicholas Robert Stiglich, T.J. Blandford, Valerie M. Ackerman, Kevin Lawrence Woodcock, John Richard Saenz, Michael T. Burke, Elane G. Thomas, Robert Anthony DiCocco, Kevin Anthony Crofts, Roger P. Strachota, Lindy A. Morgan-Dickey, Bobbie Ann Fulton, Nicole Louise Lynch, Robert DeMarco Hartshorn, Stephen Michael Hawthorne, Kristen S. Fouts, James Bernard Ryberg, Valerie R. Luczak, Randy L. Everett, Samuel Howard Ehrlich, Julie Ane Lynch, Catherine White, Felicia Nicole Jordan, Maureen Maria Farmer, Oren Charles Hilty, Curtis M. Lagassa, Kenneth Jeffrey Burson, Annette M. Allen, Robin Beth Johnson, Jerry F. Wheeler, Chakravartee Motriam, Jill Megan Sylvain, Jill A. Phelan, Kevin C. Koran, Heather M. Hiott, Bruce J. Maher, Karlee Ann Sandell, Jeffrey M. DeSantes, Sonja Renee Underwood, Marina Gavilow, Wilbert A. Ramos, Kathryn Ann Michelic, John Edward Heintschel, Paul Russell Welch, Jolleen L. Farge, Glenn Edward Feroli, Charles W. Budt, Kimberly J. Stewart, Angela Christine Thoreson, Jean A. Kerr, Richard Howard Sulak, Matthew J. Sara, John A. Imoriaco, Vanessa Lynn Girnus, Joseph F. Dunn, Crystal Dawn Massey, Donna M. Connally, Marc L. Volland, Jacqueline Gail Wilheff, JoAnna Marie Dunning, Mark Francis Borrelli, Eva Marie Winger, Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer, William H. Smith, Neal G. Hall, Sergio Pavon, James E. Burton Jr., Amaury J. Santiago, Anthony Raineri, Marc E. Hileman, Ricardo C. Forges, Barbara A. Barnett, Jay Kevin York, Karen Rita Tomory, Shelly B. Pens, Ross Michael Berman, Simona Lopes, Neal Thomas Wetmore, Alisa Ekdeshman, Chatammour L. Henderson, Judith Shelton, Geraldine Dominic, Michael Robert Alexander, Jay Patrick Fisher, Roxanne E. Eadie, Mercedes Garcia, James Edward Nannly, Kimberly Susan Ohanian, Jennifer Raines Eby, Donald Eugene Carroll Jr., AnnaKay R. Monaco, Melanie Liberatore, Pamela Kaye Houston, Gordon Roy Gerttula, Robin Riddick, Valerie J. Bobry, Christopher James Rosso, Lori P. Horton, Wiah Theodore Dogbeh, Kevin M. Gause, Mark David Stahler, Daryl Clark Ranton, Michael Todd Allen, Kimberly Renee Theobald, Pamela Jean Nelson, Celena Brooke Banks, Bill Harl Osborn, Paul Anthony Navarro, Christy Marie Webb, John Phillip Rubin, Paul A. O'Callaghan, Jennifer Abend Ward, James P. Marino, Jolie Marisa Conklin, Terri Jo Schlink, Fariba Parniani, Gerald David Oehlbert, Paige Allison Murtagh, Jerrod W. Maloy, Gary Joseph Summers, Robert James Burnell, Michael Patrick Cronin, G. Kelly Robin, Leslie Lorraine Homa, Stefanie Cora Mullins-Krupp, Gray-Paul Bossi, Demetrio Amador, Kim S. Yu, Kathy Ann Belfiore, Debra Shirlene Benbow, Jeffrey R. Nolan, Jennifer Marie Ellard, Steven D. Nero, Penni Lynn Zelinkoff, Latrese Williams, Luls Alfonso Meneses Jr., Sheree Williams, Raymond Gordon Watkins, Cynthia Darlene Michaelis, James John McNeil, Barbara Hartlander, Cheryl R. Woodruff, Terry Thomas, Patrick Brian Semenie, Cynthia Lewis Robertson, Matthew L. Thoreson, Sandra K. Kantorak, Joan Janky, John Brice Stewart, Sharon Neihu, Jessica Sue Mazzarese, Terry Dale Crosslin, Tasha Marie Andvesen, Susanne Marie Wickland, Kurt R. Finley, Cheryl D. Fingers-Li, Wendy Lynn Kirk, John R. Theisen, Minel Hider Tobertga, Timothy Michael Leonard, Samira Saha, Anthony Worth Analla, Michael Orlando Collier, Bobby Wayne Wallis, Kimberly C. Elliot, Michael R. Kozin, JoAnne Katherine Lindner, Kim Ann Godfrey, Chad Douglas Horne, Allan Brandon Jones, Jennifer L. Peldiak, Thomas David Ramsey, Chris Kakavas, Charlotte Michelle Chapman, Julie H. Wakefield, Theresa Louisa Thomas, William Arthur Harris, Deborah Lynch Kuklis, Gregory Hanson, Nicole R. Pasternak, Aleta M. Conti, Douglas Clinton Hickok, Jeanna Dampier, Nancy Craig Brice, Salvatore A. Esposito USCA Case Number 09-0437-cv. We have considered all of Novartis's arguments in support of the judgment and have found in them no merit. We vacate the judgment of the district court and remand for further proceedings not inconsistent with this opinion. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 07/06/2010. (nd)
June 26, 2009 Filing 137 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to #135 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Shana Marie Simones, Thomas Christian McDonough, Nicholas Robert Stiglich, T.J. Blandford, Valerie M. Ackerman, Kevin Lawrence Woodcock, John Richard Saenz, Michael T. Burke, Elane G. Thomas, Robert Anthony DiCocco, Kevin Anthony Crofts, Roger P. Strachota, Lindy A. Morgan-Dickey, Bobbie Ann Fulton, Nicole Louise Lynch, Robert DeMarco Hartshorn, Stephen Michael Hawthorne, Kristen S. Fouts, James Bernard Ryberg, Valerie R. Luczak, Randy L. Everett, Samuel Howard Ehrlich, Julie Ane Lynch, Catherine White, Felicia Nicole Jordan, Maureen Maria Farmer, Oren Charles Hilty, Curtis M. Lagassa, Annette M. Allen, Kenneth Jeffrey Burson, Carol Bollinger, Robin Beth Johnson, Jerry F. Wheeler, Chakravartee Motriam, Jill Megan Sylvain, Jill A. Phelan, Kevin C. Koran, Heather M. Hiott, Bruce J. Maher, Karlee Ann Sandell, Jeffrey M. DeSantes, Sonja Renee Underwood, Marina Gavilow, Wilbert A. Ramos, Kathryn Ann Michelic, John Edward Heintschel, Paul Russell Welch, Jolleen L. Farge, Charles W. Budt, Glenn Edward Feroli, Kimberly J. Stewart, Angela Christine Thoreson, Jean A. Kerr, Richard Howard Sulak, Matthew J. Sara, John A. Imoriaco, Vanessa Lynn Girnus, Joseph F. Dunn, Crystal Dawn Massey, Donna M. Connally, Marc L. Volland, Jacqueline Gail Wilheff, JoAnna Marie Dunning, Mark Francis Borrelli, Eva Marie Winger, Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer, William H. Smith, Neal G. Hall, Sergio Pavon, James E. Burton Jr., Amaury J. Santiago, Anthony Raineri, Marc E. Hileman, Barbara A. Barnett, Ricardo C. Forges, Jay Kevin York, Karen Rita Tomory, Shelly B. Pens, Ross Michael Berman, Simona Lopes, Neal Thomas Wetmore, Alisa Ekdeshman, Chatammour L. Henderson, Judith Shelton, Geraldine Dominic, Michael Robert Alexander, Roxanne E. Eadie, Jay Patrick Fisher, Daniel T. Hoffman, Mercedes Garcia, James Edward Nannly, Kimberly Susan Ohanian, Donald Eugene Carroll Jr., Jennifer Raines Eby, AnnaKay R. Monaco, Melanie Liberatore, Pamela Kaye Houston, Gordon Roy Gerttula, Robin Riddick, Valerie J. Bobry, Christopher James Rosso, Wiah Theodore Dogbeh, Lori P. Horton, Kevin M. Gause, Mark David Stahler, Daryl Clark Ranton, Michael Todd Allen, Kimberly Renee Theobald, Pamela Jean Nelson, Celena Brooke Banks, Bill Harl Osborn, Paul Anthony Navarro, Christy Marie Webb, John Phillip Rubin, Paul A. O'Callaghan, Jennifer Abend Ward, Jolie Marisa Conklin, James P. Marino, Terri Jo Schlink, Fariba Parniani, Gerald David Oehlbert, Jerrod W. Maloy, Paige Allison Murtagh, Gary Joseph Summers, Robert James Burnell, Michael Patrick Cronin, G. Kelly Robin, Leslie Lorraine Homa, Stefanie Cora Mullins-Krupp, Janet Ashenden, Gray-Paul Bossi, Demetrio Amador, Kim S. Yu, Kathy Ann Belfiore, Debra Shirlene Benbow, Michelle C. Chalupka, Jeffrey R. Nolan, Jennifer Marie Ellard, Steven D. Nero, Penni Lynn Zelinkoff, Latrese Williams, Luls Alfonso Meneses Jr., Sheree Williams, Raymond Gordon Watkins, Cynthia Darlene Michaelis, Barbara Hartlander, James John McNeil, Cheryl R. Woodruff, Terry Thomas, Patrick Brian Semenie, Cynthia Lewis Robertson, Matthew L. Thoreson, Sandra K. Kantorak, Joan Janky, John Brice Stewart, Sharon Neihu, Jessica Sue Mazzarese, Terry Dale Crosslin, Tasha Marie Andvesen, Susanne Marie Wickland, Kurt R. Finley, Cheryl D. Fingers-Li, Wendy Lynn Kirk, John R. Theisen, Minel Hider Tobertga, Timothy Michael Leonard, Samira Saha, Anthony Worth Analla, Michael Orlando Collier, Bobby Wayne Wallis, Kimberly C. Elliot, Michael R. Kozin, JoAnne Katherine Lindner, Kim Ann Godfrey, Chad Douglas Horne, Allan Brandon Jones, Jennifer L. Peldiak, Thomas David Ramsey, Charlotte Michelle Chapman, Chris Kakavas, Julie H. Wakefield, Theresa Louisa Thomas, William Arthur Harris, Deborah Lynch Kuklis, Gregory Hanson, Nicole R. Pasternak, Aleta M. Conti, Jeanna Dampier, Nancy Craig Brice, Douglas Clinton Hickok, Salvatore A. Esposito, #134 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Shana Marie Simones, Thomas Christian McDonough, Nicholas Robert Stiglich, T.J. Blandford, Valerie M. Ackerman, Kevin Lawrence Woodcock, John Richard Saenz, Michael T. Burke, Elane G. Thomas, Robert Anthony DiCocco, Kevin Anthony Crofts, Roger P. Strachota, Lindy A. Morgan-Dickey, Bobbie Ann Fulton, Nicole Louise Lynch, Robert DeMarco Hartshorn, Stephen Michael Hawthorne, Kristen S. Fouts, James Bernard Ryberg, Valerie R. Luczak, Randy L. Everett, Samuel Howard Ehrlich, Julie Ane Lynch, Catherine White, Felicia Nicole Jordan, Maureen Maria Farmer, Oren Charles Hilty, Curtis M. Lagassa, Kenneth Jeffrey Burson, Annette M. Allen, Robin Beth Johnson, Jerry F. Wheeler, Chakravartee Motriam, Jill Megan Sylvain, Jill A. Phelan, Kevin C. Koran, Heather M. Hiott, Bruce J. Maher, Karlee Ann Sandell, Jeffrey M. DeSantes, Sonja Renee Underwood, Marina Gavilow, Wilbert A. Ramos, Kathryn Ann Michelic, John Edward Heintschel, Paul Russell Welch, Jolleen L. Farge, Glenn Edward Feroli, Charles W. Budt, Kimberly J. Stewart, Angela Christine Thoreson, Jean A. Kerr, Richard Howard Sulak, Matthew J. Sara, John A. Imoriaco, Vanessa Lynn Girnus, Joseph F. Dunn, Crystal Dawn Massey, Donna M. Connally, Marc L. Volland, Jacqueline Gail Wilheff, JoAnna Marie Dunning, Mark Francis Borrelli, Eva Marie Winger, Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer, William H. Smith, Neal G. Hall, Sergio Pavon, James E. Burton Jr., Amaury J. Santiago, Anthony Raineri, Marc E. Hileman, Ricardo C. Forges, Barbara A. Barnett, Jay Kevin York, Karen Rita Tomory, Shelly B. Pens, Ross Michael Berman, Simona Lopes, Neal Thomas Wetmore, Alisa Ekdeshman, Chatammour L. Henderson, Judith Shelton, Geraldine Dominic, Michael Robert Alexander, Jay Patrick Fisher, Roxanne E. Eadie, Mercedes Garcia, James Edward Nannly, Kimberly Susan Ohanian, Jennifer Raines Eby, Donald Eugene Carroll Jr., AnnaKay R. Monaco, Melanie Liberatore, Pamela Kaye Houston, Gordon Roy Gerttula, Robin Riddick, Valerie J. Bobry, Christopher James Rosso, Lori P. Horton, Wiah Theodore Dogbeh, Kevin M. Gause, Mark David Stahler, Daryl Clark Ranton, Michael Todd Allen, Kimberly Renee Theobald, Pamela Jean Nelson, Celena Brooke Banks, Bill Harl Osborn, Paul Anthony Navarro, Christy Marie Webb, John Phillip Rubin, Paul A. O'Callaghan, Jennifer Abend Ward, James P. Marino, Jolie Marisa Conklin, Terri Jo Schlink, Fariba Parniani, Gerald David Oehlbert, Paige Allison Murtagh, Jerrod W. Maloy, Gary Joseph Summers, Robert James Burnell, Michael Patrick Cronin, G. Kelly Robin, Leslie Lorraine Homa, Stefanie Cora Mullins-Krupp, Gray-Paul Bossi, Demetrio Amador, Kim S. Yu, Kathy Ann Belfiore, Debra Shirlene Benbow, Jeffrey R. Nolan, Jennifer Marie Ellard, Steven D. Nero, Penni Lynn Zelinkoff, Latrese Williams, Luls Alfonso Meneses Jr., Sheree Williams, Raymond Gordon Watkins, Cynthia Darlene Michaelis, James John McNeil, Barbara Hartlander, Cheryl R. Woodruff, Terry Thomas, Patrick Brian Semenie, Cynthia Lewis Robertson, Matthew L. Thoreson, Sandra K. Kantorak, Joan Janky, John Brice Stewart, Sharon Neihu, Jessica Sue Mazzarese, Terry Dale Crosslin, Tasha Marie Andvesen, Susanne Marie Wickland, Kurt R. Finley, Cheryl D. Fingers-Li, Wendy Lynn Kirk, John R. Theisen, Minel Hider Tobertga, Timothy Michael Leonard, Samira Saha, Anthony Worth Analla, Michael Orlando Collier, Bobby Wayne Wallis, Kimberly C. Elliot, Michael R. Kozin, JoAnne Katherine Lindner, Kim Ann Godfrey, Chad Douglas Horne, Allan Brandon Jones, Jennifer L. Peldiak, Thomas David Ramsey, Chris Kakavas, Charlotte Michelle Chapman, Julie H. Wakefield, Theresa Louisa Thomas, William Arthur Harris, Deborah Lynch Kuklis, Gregory Hanson, Nicole R. Pasternak, Aleta M. Conti, Douglas Clinton Hickok, Jeanna Dampier, Nancy Craig Brice, Salvatore A. Esposito USCA Case Number 09-0437-cv. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellants' motion to stay the briefing schedule is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 6/25/2009. (nd)
February 18, 2009 Filing 136 Second Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Supplemental Index to the record on Appeal for #135 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Shana Marie Simones, Thomas Christian McDonough, Nicholas Robert Stiglich, T.J. Blandford, Valerie M. Ackerman, Kevin Lawrence Woodcock, John Richard Saenz, Michael T. Burke, Elane G. Thomas, Robert Anthony DiCocco, Kevin Anthony Crofts, Roger P. Strachota, Lindy A. Morgan-Dickey, Bobbie Ann Fulton, Nicole Louise Lynch, Robert DeMarco Hartshorn, Stephen Michael Hawthorne, Kristen S. Fouts, James Bernard Ryberg, Valerie R. Luczak, Randy L. Everett, Samuel Howard Ehrlich, Julie Ane Lynch, Catherine White, Felicia Nicole Jordan, Maureen Maria Farmer, Oren Charles Hilty, Curtis M. Lagassa, Annette M. Allen, Kenneth Jeffrey Burson, Carol Bollinger, Robin Beth Johnson, Jerry F. Wheeler, Chakravartee Motriam, Jill Megan Sylvain, Jill A. Phelan, Kevin C. Koran, Heather M. Hiott, Bruce J. Maher, Karlee Ann Sandell, Jeffrey M. DeSantes, Sonja Renee Underwood, Marina Gavilow, Wilbert A. Ramos, Kathryn Ann Michelic, John Edward Heintschel, Paul Russell Welch, Jolleen L. Farge, Charles W. Budt, Glenn Edward Feroli, Kimberly J. Stewart, Angela Christine Thoreson, Jean A. Kerr, Richard Howard Sulak, Matthew J. Sara, John A. Imoriaco, Vanessa Lynn Girnus, Joseph F. Dunn, Crystal Dawn Massey, Donna M. Connally, Marc L. Volland, Jacqueline Gail Wilheff, JoAnna Marie Dunning, Mark Francis Borrelli, Eva Marie Winger, Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer, William H. Smith, Neal G. Hall, Sergio Pavon, James E. Burton Jr., Amaury J. Santiago, Anthony Raineri, Marc E. Hileman, Barbara A. Barnett, Ricardo C. Forges, Jay Kevin York, Karen Rita Tomory, Shelly B. Pens, Ross Michael Berman, Simona Lopes, Neal Thomas Wetmore, Alisa Ekdeshman, Chatammour L. Henderson, Judith Shelton, Geraldine Dominic, Michael Robert Alexander, Roxanne E. Eadie, Jay Patrick Fisher, Daniel T. Hoffman, Mercedes Garcia, James Edward Nannly, Kimberly Susan Ohanian, Donald Eugene Carroll Jr., Jennifer Raines Eby, AnnaKay R. Monaco, Melanie Liberatore, Pamela Kaye Houston, Gordon Roy Gerttula, Robin Riddick, Valerie J. Bobry, Christopher James Rosso, Wiah Theodore Dogbeh, Lori P. Horton, Kevin M. Gause, Mark David Stahler, Daryl Clark Ranton, Michael Todd Allen, Kimberly Renee Theobald, Pamela Jean Nelson, Celena Brooke Banks, Bill Harl Osborn, Paul Anthony Navarro, Christy Marie Webb, John Phillip Rubin, Paul A. O'Callaghan, Jennifer Abend Ward, Jolie Marisa Conklin, James P. Marino, Terri Jo Schlink, Fariba Parniani, Gerald David Oehlbert, Jerrod W. Maloy, Paige Allison Murtagh, Gary Joseph Summers, Robert James Burnell, Michael Patrick Cronin, G. Kelly Robin, Leslie Lorraine Homa, Stefanie Cora Mullins-Krupp, Janet Ashenden, Gray-Paul Bossi, Demetrio Amador, Kim S. Yu, Kathy Ann Belfiore, Debra Shirlene Benbow, Michelle C. Chalupka, Jeffrey R. Nolan, Jennifer Marie Ellard, Steven D. Nero, Penni Lynn Zelinkoff, Latrese Williams, Luls Alfonso Meneses Jr., Sheree Williams, Raymond Gordon Watkins, Cynthia Darlene Michaelis, Barbara Hartlander, James John McNeil, Cheryl R. Woodruff, Terry Thomas, Patrick Brian Semenie, Cynthia Lewis Robertson, Matthew L. Thoreson, Sandra K. Kantorak, Joan Janky, John Brice Stewart, Sharon Neihu, Jessica Sue Mazzarese, Terry Dale Crosslin, Tasha Marie Andvesen, Susanne Marie Wickland, Kurt R. Finley, Cheryl D. Fingers-Li, Wendy Lynn Kirk, John R. Theisen, Minel Hider Tobertga, Timothy Michael Leonard, Samira Saha, Anthony Worth Analla, Michael Orlando Collier, Bobby Wayne Wallis, Kimberly C. Elliot, Michael R. Kozin, JoAnne Katherine Lindner, Kim Ann Godfrey, Chad Douglas Horne, Allan Brandon Jones, Jennifer L. Peldiak, Thomas David Ramsey, Charlotte Michelle Chapman, Chris Kakavas, Julie H. Wakefield, Theresa Louisa Thomas, William Arthur Harris, Deborah Lynch Kuklis, Gregory Hanson, Nicole R. Pasternak, Aleta M. Conti, Jeanna Dampier, Nancy Craig Brice, Douglas Clinton Hickok, Salvatore A. Esposito, #134 Notice of Appeal, filed by Shana Marie Simones, Thomas Christian McDonough, Nicholas Robert Stiglich, T.J. Blandford, Valerie M. Ackerman, Kevin Lawrence Woodcock, John Richard Saenz, Michael T. Burke, Elane G. Thomas, Robert Anthony DiCocco, Kevin Anthony Crofts, Roger P. Strachota, Lindy A. Morgan-Dickey, Bobbie Ann Fulton, Nicole Louise Lynch, Robert DeMarco Hartshorn, Stephen Michael Hawthorne, Kristen S. Fouts, James Bernard Ryberg, Valerie R. Luczak, Randy L. Everett, Samuel Howard Ehrlich, Julie Ane Lynch, Catherine White, Felicia Nicole Jordan, Maureen Maria Farmer, Oren Charles Hilty, Curtis M. Lagassa, Kenneth Jeffrey Burson, Annette M. Allen, Robin Beth Johnson, Jerry F. Wheeler, Chakravartee Motriam, Jill Megan Sylvain, Jill A. Phelan, Kevin C. Koran, Heather M. Hiott, Bruce J. Maher, Karlee Ann Sandell, Jeffrey M. DeSantes, Sonja Renee Underwood, Marina Gavilow, Wilbert A. Ramos, Kathryn Ann Michelic, John Edward Heintschel, Paul Russell Welch, Jolleen L. Farge, Glenn Edward Feroli, Charles W. Budt, Kimberly J. Stewart, Angela Christine Thoreson, Jean A. Kerr, Richard Howard Sulak, Matthew J. Sara, John A. Imoriaco, Vanessa Lynn Girnus, Joseph F. Dunn, Crystal Dawn Massey, Donna M. Connally, Marc L. Volland, Jacqueline Gail Wilheff, JoAnna Marie Dunning, Mark Francis Borrelli, Eva Marie Winger, Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer, William H. Smith, Neal G. Hall, Sergio Pavon, James E. Burton Jr., Amaury J. Santiago, Anthony Raineri, Marc E. Hileman, Ricardo C. Forges, Barbara A. Barnett, Jay Kevin York, Karen Rita Tomory, Shelly B. Pens, Ross Michael Berman, Simona Lopes, Neal Thomas Wetmore, Alisa Ekdeshman, Chatammour L. Henderson, Judith Shelton, Geraldine Dominic, Michael Robert Alexander, Jay Patrick Fisher, Roxanne E. Eadie, Mercedes Garcia, James Edward Nannly, Kimberly Susan Ohanian, Jennifer Raines Eby, Donald Eugene Carroll Jr., AnnaKay R. Monaco, Melanie Liberatore, Pamela Kaye Houston, Gordon Roy Gerttula, Robin Riddick, Valerie J. Bobry, Christopher James Rosso, Lori P. Horton, Wiah Theodore Dogbeh, Kevin M. Gause, Mark David Stahler, Daryl Clark Ranton, Michael Todd Allen, Kimberly Renee Theobald, Pamela Jean Nelson, Celena Brooke Banks, Bill Harl Osborn, Paul Anthony Navarro, Christy Marie Webb, John Phillip Rubin, Paul A. O'Callaghan, Jennifer Abend Ward, James P. Marino, Jolie Marisa Conklin, Terri Jo Schlink, Fariba Parniani, Gerald David Oehlbert, Paige Allison Murtagh, Jerrod W. Maloy, Gary Joseph Summers, Robert James Burnell, Michael Patrick Cronin, G. Kelly Robin, Leslie Lorraine Homa, Stefanie Cora Mullins-Krupp, Gray-Paul Bossi, Demetrio Amador, Kim S. Yu, Kathy Ann Belfiore, Debra Shirlene Benbow, Jeffrey R. Nolan, Jennifer Marie Ellard, Steven D. Nero, Penni Lynn Zelinkoff, Latrese Williams, Luls Alfonso Meneses Jr., Sheree Williams, Raymond Gordon Watkins, Cynthia Darlene Michaelis, James John McNeil, Barbara Hartlander, Cheryl R. Woodruff, Terry Thomas, Patrick Brian Semenie, Cynthia Lewis Robertson, Matthew L. Thoreson, Sandra K. Kantorak, Joan Janky, John Brice Stewart, Sharon Neihu, Jessica Sue Mazzarese, Terry Dale Crosslin, Tasha Marie Andvesen, Susanne Marie Wickland, Kurt R. Finley, Cheryl D. Fingers-Li, Wendy Lynn Kirk, John R. Theisen, Minel Hider Tobertga, Timothy Michael Leonard, Samira Saha, Anthony Worth Analla, Michael Orlando Collier, Bobby Wayne Wallis, Kimberly C. Elliot, Michael R. Kozin, JoAnne Katherine Lindner, Kim Ann Godfrey, Chad Douglas Horne, Allan Brandon Jones, Jennifer L. Peldiak, Thomas David Ramsey, Chris Kakavas, Charlotte Michelle Chapman, Julie H. Wakefield, Theresa Louisa Thomas, William Arthur Harris, Deborah Lynch Kuklis, Gregory Hanson, Nicole R. Pasternak, Aleta M. Conti, Douglas Clinton Hickok, Jeanna Dampier, Nancy Craig Brice, Salvatore A. Esposito USCA Case Number 09-0437, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Supplemental Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (tp).
February 10, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #135 Amended Notice of Appeal.(tp)
February 10, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #135 Amended Notice of Appeal.(tp)
February 10, 2009 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Supplemental Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #61 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #1 MDL Conditional Transfer In Order, #95 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #65 Endorsed Letter, #87 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #51 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #25 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #84 Endorsed Letter, #124 Endorsed Letter, #74 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #49 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #122 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #91 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #31 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #63 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #14 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #64 Protective Order, #33 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #117 Endorsed Letter, #103 MOTION To Bar Plaintiff's Expert Brian T. Farrington. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #16 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #12 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #27 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer. filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #17 JOINT MOTION For Order Certifying FLSA Collective Action, Certifying Rule 23 Class Actions And Approving Notice. filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Minel Hider Tobertga, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #4 Order,, #83 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines, #72 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #102 Rule 56.1 Statement filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #73 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #42 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #39 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #96 Endorsed Letter, #94 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #50 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #41 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #22 Case Management Plan,,, #82 Notice of Appearance filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #69 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #2 Order, #132 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Disqualify, #71 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #118 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #110 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #111 Rule 56.1 Statement, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #121 Response, filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #38 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #129 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #126 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #104 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #92 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #26 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #123 Brief, filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #52 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #24 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #48 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #28 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #97 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #62 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #116 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #127 Notice of Appearance filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #20 Answer to Complaint filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #45 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #133 Clerk's Judgment, #58 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #57 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #130 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #119 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #109 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #21 Answer to Complaint filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #10 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #98 Endorsed Letter, #43 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #60 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #8 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #70 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #125 MOTION to Disqualify Canice Prendergast and William Ashton. filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #75 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #36 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order. filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Minel Hider Tobertga, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #13 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, #53 Endorsed Letter, #128 Notice of Appearance filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #55 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #80 Endorsed Letter, #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #15 Case Management Plan, #40 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #120 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #107 Rule 56.1 Statement, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #76 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #90 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #77 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #19 Order, #89 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #37 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #78 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #5 Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report, #68 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #134 Notice of Appeal, filed by Shana Marie Simones, Thomas Christian McDonough, Nicholas Robert Stiglich, T.J. Blandford, Valerie M. Ackerman, Kevin Lawrence Woodcock, John Richard Saenz, Michael T. Burke, Elane G. Thomas, Robert Anthony DiCocco, Kevin Anthony Crofts, Roger P. Strachota, Lindy A. Morgan-Dickey, Bobbie Ann Fulton, Nicole Louise Lynch, Robert DeMarco Hartshorn, Stephen Michael Hawthorne, Kristen S. Fouts, James Bernard Ryberg, Valerie R. Luczak, Randy L. Everett, Samuel Howard Ehrlich, Julie Ane Lynch, Catherine White, Felicia Nicole Jordan, Maureen Maria Farmer, Oren Charles Hilty, Curtis M. Lagassa, Annette M. Allen, Kenneth Jeffrey Burson, Robin Beth Johnson, Jerry F. Wheeler, Chakravartee Motriam, Jill Megan Sylvain, Jill A. Phelan, Kevin C. Koran, Heather M. Hiott, Bruce J. Maher, Karlee Ann Sandell, Jeffrey M. DeSantes, Sonja Renee Underwood, Marina Gavilow, Wilbert A. Ramos, Kathryn Ann Michelic, John Edward Heintschel, Paul Russell Welch, Jolleen L. Farge, Charles W. Budt, Glenn Edward Feroli, Kimberly J. Stewart, Angela Christine Thoreson, Jean A. Kerr, Richard Howard Sulak, Matthew J. Sara, John A. Imoriaco, Joseph F. Dunn, Vanessa Lynn Girnus, Crystal Dawn Massey, Donna M. Connally, Marc L. Volland, Jacqueline Gail Wilheff, JoAnna Marie Dunning, Mark Francis Borrelli, Eva Marie Winger, Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer, William H. Smith, Neal G. Hall, Sergio Pavon, James E. Burton Jr., Amaury J. Santiago, Anthony Raineri, Marc E. Hileman, Barbara A. Barnett, Ricardo C. Forges, Jay Kevin York, Karen Rita Tomory, Shelly B. Pens, Ross Michael Berman, Simona Lopes, Neal Thomas Wetmore, Alisa Ekdeshman, Chatammour L. Henderson, Judith Shelton, Geraldine Dominic, Michael Robert Alexander, Roxanne E. Eadie, Jay Patrick Fisher, Mercedes Garcia, James Edward Nannly, Donald Eugene Carroll Jr., Jennifer Raines Eby, Kimberly Susan Ohanian, AnnaKay R. Monaco, Melanie Liberatore, Pamela Kaye Houston, Gordon Roy Gerttula, Robin Riddick, Valerie J. Bobry, Christopher James Rosso, Wiah Theodore Dogbeh, Lori P. Horton, Kevin M. Gause, Mark David Stahler, Daryl Cla
February 9, 2009 Filing 135 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: #134 Notice of Appeal, #132 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Disqualify, #133 Clerk's Judgment. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Valerie M. Ackerman, Michael Robert Alexander, Annette M. Allen, Michael Todd Allen, Demetrio Amador, Tasha Marie Andvesen, Anthony Worth Analla, Janet Ashenden, Celena Brooke Banks, Barbara A. Barnett, Kathy Ann Belfiore, Debra Shirlene Benbow, Ross Michael Berman, T.J. Blandford, Valerie J. Bobry, Mark Francis Borrelli, Gray-Paul Bossi, Nancy Craig Brice, Charles W. Budt, Michael T. Burke, Robert James Burnell, Kenneth Jeffrey Burson, James E. Burton Jr., Donald Eugene Carroll Jr., Michelle C. Chalupka, Charlotte Michelle Chapman, Michael Orlando Collier, Jolie Marisa Conklin, Donna M. Connally, Aleta M. Conti, Kevin Anthony Crofts, Michael Patrick Cronin, Terry Dale Crosslin, Jeanna Dampier, Jeffrey M. DeSantes, Robert Anthony DiCocco, Wiah Theodore Dogbeh, Geraldine Dominic, Joseph F. Dunn, JoAnna Marie Dunning, Roxanne E. Eadie, Jennifer Raines Eby, Samuel Howard Ehrlich, Alisa Ekdeshman, Jennifer Marie Ellard, Kimberly C. Elliot, Salvatore A. Esposito, Randy L. Everett, Jolleen L. Farge, Maureen Maria Farmer, Glenn Edward Feroli, Cheryl D. Fingers-Li, Kurt R. Finley, Jay Patrick Fisher, Ricardo C. Forges, Kristen S. Fouts, Bobbie Ann Fulton, Mercedes Garcia, Kevin M. Gause, Marina Gavilow, Gordon Roy Gerttula, Vanessa Lynn Girnus, Kim Ann Godfrey, Neal G. Hall, Gregory Hanson, William Arthur Harris, Barbara Hartlander, Robert DeMarco Hartshorn, Stephen Michael Hawthorne, John Edward Heintschel, Chatammour L. Henderson, Douglas Clinton Hickok, Marc E. Hileman, Oren Charles Hilty, Heather M. Hiott, Daniel T. Hoffman, Leslie Lorraine Homa, Chad Douglas Horne, Lori P. Horton, Pamela Kaye Houston, John A. Imoriaco, Joan Janky, Robin Beth Johnson, Allan Brandon Jones, Felicia Nicole Jordan, Chris Kakavas, Sandra K. Kantorak, Jean A. Kerr, Wendy Lynn Kirk, Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer, Kevin C. Koran, Michael R. Kozin, Deborah Lynch Kuklis, Curtis M. Lagassa, Timothy Michael Leonard, Melanie Liberatore, JoAnne Katherine Lindner, Valerie R. Luczak, Julie Ane Lynch, Nicole Louise Lynch, Bruce J. Maher, Jerrod W. Maloy, James P. Marino, Crystal Dawn Massey, Jessica Sue Mazzarese, Thomas Christian McDonough, James John McNeil, Luls Alfonso Meneses Jr., Cynthia Darlene Michaelis, Kathryn Ann Michelic, AnnaKay R. Monaco, Lindy A. Morgan-Dickey, Chakravartee Motriam, Stefanie Cora Mullins-Krupp, Paige Allison Murtagh, James Edward Nannly, Paul Anthony Navarro, Sharon Neihu, Pamela Jean Nelson, Steven D. Nero, Jeffrey R. Nolan, Paul A. O'Callaghan, Gerald David Oehlbert, Kimberly Susan Ohanian, Bill Harl Osborn, Fariba Parniani, Nicole R. Pasternak, Sergio Pavon, Jennifer L. Peldiak, Shelly B. Pens, Jill A. Phelan, Anthony Raineri, Wilbert A. Ramos, Thomas David Ramsey, Daryl Clark Ranton, Robin Riddick, Cynthia Lewis Robertson, G. Kelly Robin, Christopher James Rosso, John Phillip Rubin, James Bernard Ryberg, John Richard Saenz, Samira Saha, Karlee Ann Sandell, Amaury J. Santiago, Matthew J. Sara, Terri Jo Schlink, Patrick Brian Semenie, Judith Shelton, Shana Marie Simones, William H. Smith, Mark David Stahler, Kimberly J. Stewart, John Brice Stewart, Nicholas Robert Stiglich, Roger P. Strachota, Richard Howard Sulak, Gary Joseph Summers, Jill Megan Sylvain, John R. Theisen, Kimberly Renee Theobald, Elane G. Thomas, Terry Thomas, Theresa Louisa Thomas, Angela Christine Thoreson, Matthew L. Thoreson, Karen Rita Tomory, Sonja Renee Underwood, Marc L. Volland, Julie H. Wakefield, Bobby Wayne Wallis, Jennifer Abend Ward, Raymond Gordon Watkins, Christy Marie Webb, Paul Russell Welch, Neal Thomas Wetmore, Jerry F. Wheeler, Susanne Marie Wickland, Jacqueline Gail Wilheff, Latrese Williams, Sheree Williams, Eva Marie Winger, Kevin Lawrence Woodcock, Cheryl R. Woodruff, Jay Kevin York, Kim S. Yu, Penni Lynn Zelinkoff, Carol Bollinger. (tp)
January 31, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #134 Notice of Appeal.(tp)
January 31, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #134 Notice of Appeal.(tp)
January 31, 2009 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #61 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #1 MDL Conditional Transfer In Order, #95 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #65 Endorsed Letter, #87 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #51 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #25 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #84 Endorsed Letter, #124 Endorsed Letter, #74 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #49 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #122 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #91 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #31 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #63 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #14 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #64 Protective Order, #33 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #117 Endorsed Letter, #103 MOTION To Bar Plaintiff's Expert Brian T. Farrington. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #16 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #12 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #27 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer. filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #17 JOINT MOTION For Order Certifying FLSA Collective Action, Certifying Rule 23 Class Actions And Approving Notice. filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Minel Hider Tobertga, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #4 Order,, #83 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines, #72 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #102 Rule 56.1 Statement filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #73 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #42 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #39 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #96 Endorsed Letter, #94 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #50 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #41 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #22 Case Management Plan,,, #82 Notice of Appearance filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #69 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #2 Order, #132 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Disqualify, #71 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #118 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #110 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #111 Rule 56.1 Statement, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #121 Response, filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #38 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #129 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #126 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #104 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #92 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #26 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #123 Brief, filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #52 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #24 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #48 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #28 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #97 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #62 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #116 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #127 Notice of Appearance filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #20 Answer to Complaint filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #45 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #133 Clerk's Judgment, #58 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #57 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #130 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #119 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #109 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #21 Answer to Complaint filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #10 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #98 Endorsed Letter, #43 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #60 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #8 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #70 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #125 MOTION to Disqualify Canice Prendergast and William Ashton. filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #75 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #36 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order. filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Minel Hider Tobertga, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., #13 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, #53 Endorsed Letter, #128 Notice of Appearance filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #55 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #80 Endorsed Letter, #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #15 Case Management Plan, #40 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #120 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #107 Rule 56.1 Statement, filed by Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #76 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #90 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #77 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #19 Order, #89 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, #37 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #78 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #5 Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report, #68 Notice (Other) filed by Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, #134 Notice of Appeal, filed by Shana Marie Simones, Thomas Christian McDonough, Nicholas Robert Stiglich, T.J. Blandford, Valerie M. Ackerman, Kevin Lawrence Woodcock, John Richard Saenz, Michael T. Burke, Elane G. Thomas, Robert Anthony DiCocco, Kevin Anthony Crofts, Roger P. Strachota, Lindy A. Morgan-Dickey, Bobbie Ann Fulton, Nicole Louise Lynch, Robert DeMarco Hartshorn, Stephen Michael Hawthorne, Kristen S. Fouts, James Bernard Ryberg, Valerie R. Luczak, Randy L. Everett, Samuel Howard Ehrlich, Julie Ane Lynch, Catherine White, Felicia Nicole Jordan, Maureen Maria Farmer, Oren Charles Hilty, Curtis M. Lagassa, Annette M. Allen, Kenneth Jeffrey Burson, Robin Beth Johnson, Jerry F. Wheeler, Chakravartee Motriam, Jill Megan Sylvain, Jill A. Phelan, Kevin C. Koran, Heather M. Hiott, Bruce J. Maher, Karlee Ann Sandell, Jeffrey M. DeSantes, Sonja Renee Underwood, Marina Gavilow, Wilbert A. Ramos, Kathryn Ann Michelic, John Edward Heintschel, Paul Russell Welch, Jolleen L. Farge, Charles W. Budt, Glenn Edward Feroli, Kimberly J. Stewart, Angela Christine Thoreson, Jean A. Kerr, Richard Howard Sulak, Matthew J. Sara, John A. Imoriaco, Joseph F. Dunn, Vanessa Lynn Girnus, Crystal Dawn Massey, Donna M. Connally, Marc L. Volland, Jacqueline Gail Wilheff, JoAnna Marie Dunning, Mark Francis Borrelli, Eva Marie Winger, Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer, William H. Smith, Neal G. Hall, Sergio Pavon, James E. Burton Jr., Amaury J. Santiago, Anthony Raineri, Marc E. Hileman, Barbara A. Barnett, Ricardo C. Forges, Jay Kevin York, Karen Rita Tomory, Shelly B. Pens, Ross Michael Berman, Simona Lopes, Neal Thomas Wetmore, Alisa Ekdeshman, Chatammour L. Henderson, Judith Shelton, Geraldine Dominic, Michael Robert Alexander, Roxanne E. Eadie, Jay Patrick Fisher, Mercedes Garcia, James Edward Nannly, Donald Eugene Carroll Jr., Jennifer Raines Eby, Kimberly Susan Ohanian, AnnaKay R. Monaco, Melanie Liberatore, Pamela Kaye Houston, Gordon Roy Gerttula, Robin Riddick, Valerie J. Bobry, Christopher James Rosso, Wiah Theodore Dogbeh, Lori P. Horton, Kevin M. Gause, Mark David Stahler, Daryl Clark Ranton, Micha
January 30, 2009 Filing 134 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #132 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Disqualify, #133 Clerk's Judgment. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Valerie M. Ackerman, Michael Robert Alexander, Annette M. Allen, Michael Todd Allen, Demetrio Amador, Tasha Marie Andvesen, Anthony Worth Analla, Celena Brooke Banks, Barbara A. Barnett, Kathy Ann Belfiore, Debra Shirlene Benbow, Ross Michael Berman, T.J. Blandford, Valerie J. Bobry, Mark Francis Borrelli, Gray-Paul Bossi, Nancy Craig Brice, Charles W. Budt, Michael T. Burke, Robert James Burnell, Kenneth Jeffrey Burson, James E. Burton Jr., Donald Eugene Carroll Jr., Charlotte Michelle Chapman, Michael Orlando Collier, Jolie Marisa Conklin, Donna M. Connally, Aleta M. Conti, Kevin Anthony Crofts, Michael Patrick Cronin, Terry Dale Crosslin, Jeanna Dampier, Jeffrey M. DeSantes, Robert Anthony DiCocco, Wiah Theodore Dogbeh, Geraldine Dominic, Joseph F. Dunn, JoAnna Marie Dunning, Roxanne E. Eadie, Jennifer Raines Eby, Samuel Howard Ehrlich, Alisa Ekdeshman, Jennifer Marie Ellard, Kimberly C. Elliot, Salvatore A. Esposito, Randy L. Everett, Jolleen L. Farge, Maureen Maria Farmer, Glenn Edward Feroli, Cheryl D. Fingers-Li, Kurt R. Finley, Jay Patrick Fisher, Ricardo C. Forges, Kristen S. Fouts, Bobbie Ann Fulton, Mercedes Garcia, Kevin M. Gause, Marina Gavilow, Gordon Roy Gerttula, Vanessa Lynn Girnus, Kim Ann Godfrey, Neal G. Hall, Gregory Hanson, William Arthur Harris, Barbara Hartlander, Robert DeMarco Hartshorn, Stephen Michael Hawthorne, John Edward Heintschel, Chatammour L. Henderson, Douglas Clinton Hickok, Marc E. Hileman, Oren Charles Hilty, Heather M. Hiott, Leslie Lorraine Homa, Chad Douglas Horne, Lori P. Horton, Pamela Kaye Houston, John A. Imoriaco, Joan Janky, Robin Beth Johnson, Allan Brandon Jones, Felicia Nicole Jordan, Chris Kakavas, Sandra K. Kantorak, Jean A. Kerr, Wendy Lynn Kirk, Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer, Kevin C. Koran, Michael R. Kozin, Deborah Lynch Kuklis, Curtis M. Lagassa, Timothy Michael Leonard, Melanie Liberatore, JoAnne Katherine Lindner, Valerie R. Luczak, Julie Ane Lynch, Nicole Louise Lynch, Bruce J. Maher, Jerrod W. Maloy, James P. Marino, Crystal Dawn Massey, Jessica Sue Mazzarese, Thomas Christian McDonough, James John McNeil, Luls Alfonso Meneses Jr., Cynthia Darlene Michaelis, Kathryn Ann Michelic, AnnaKay R. Monaco, Lindy A. Morgan-Dickey, Chakravartee Motriam, Stefanie Cora Mullins-Krupp, Paige Allison Murtagh, James Edward Nannly, Paul Anthony Navarro, Sharon Neihu, Pamela Jean Nelson, Steven D. Nero, Jeffrey R. Nolan, Paul A. O'Callaghan, Gerald David Oehlbert, Kimberly Susan Ohanian, Bill Harl Osborn, Fariba Parniani, Nicole R. Pasternak, Sergio Pavon, Jennifer L. Peldiak, Shelly B. Pens, Jill A. Phelan, Anthony Raineri, Wilbert A. Ramos, Thomas David Ramsey, Daryl Clark Ranton, Robin Riddick, Cynthia Lewis Robertson, G. Kelly Robin, Christopher James Rosso, John Phillip Rubin, James Bernard Ryberg, John Richard Saenz, Samira Saha, Karlee Ann Sandell, Amaury J. Santiago, Matthew J. Sara, Terri Jo Schlink, Patrick Brian Semenie, Judith Shelton, Shana Marie Simones, William H. Smith, Mark David Stahler, Kimberly J. Stewart, John Brice Stewart, Nicholas Robert Stiglich, Roger P. Strachota, Richard Howard Sulak, Gary Joseph Summers, Jill Megan Sylvain, John R. Theisen, Kimberly Renee Theobald, Elane G. Thomas, Terry Thomas, Theresa Louisa Thomas, Angela Christine Thoreson, Matthew L. Thoreson, Karen Rita Tomory, Sonja Renee Underwood, Marc L. Volland, Julie H. Wakefield, Bobby Wayne Wallis, Jennifer Abend Ward, Raymond Gordon Watkins, Christy Marie Webb, Paul Russell Welch, Neal Thomas Wetmore, Jerry F. Wheeler, Susanne Marie Wickland, Jacqueline Gail Wilheff, Latrese Williams, Sheree Williams, Eva Marie Winger, Kevin Lawrence Woodcock, Cheryl R. Woodruff, Jay Kevin York, Kim S. Yu, Penni Lynn Zelinkoff. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 676666. (tp)
January 13, 2009 Filing 133 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated January 12, 2009, defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted and plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is denied; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 1/13/09) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(ml)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OPINION & ORDER: CONCLUSION: For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment and terminate this matter.(Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on January 12, 2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
January 12, 2009 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (47 in 1:06-cv-11475-PAC, 47 in 1:06-cv-11475-PAC, 47 in 1:06-cv-11475-PAC) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Disqualify to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
November 25, 2008 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/18/08 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (ama)
November 18, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Oral Argument held on 11/18/2008. REMARK: The court reserved issuing a decision. See transcript for complete details of this proceeding. (Court Reporter Sam Mauro) (mov)
October 2, 2008 Calendar Entry: Oral Argument set for 11/18/2008 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty (set via e-mail by Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
July 3, 2008 Filing 130 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #125 MOTION to Disqualify Canice Prendergast and William Ashton.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sanford, David)
June 26, 2008 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #125 MOTION to Disqualify Canice Prendergast and William Ashton.. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schnadig, Richard)
June 23, 2008 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marian Anne Waldmann on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Waldmann, Marian)
June 23, 2008 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Linda E. Shostak on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Shostak, Linda)
June 19, 2008 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #125 MOTION to Disqualify Canice Prendergast and William Ashton.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sanford, David)
June 19, 2008 Filing 125 MOTION to Disqualify Canice Prendergast and William Ashton. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes.(Sanford, David)
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David Sanford dated June 6, 2008 re: Plaintiffs request for a conference regarding the exclusion of Defendant's expert witness, Canice Prendergast and William Ashton, pursuant to Rule 3(d). ENDORSEMENT: There is no need for a conference in this matter. Plaintiffs may, if they wish, submit a memo of law (no longer than 10 pages) in support of their motion to exclude the export testimony of Prendergast and Ashton. Defendants may respond in like amount, and plaintiffs reply will be limited to 5 pages. If possible the briefing on this issue should be congruent with the schedule for the summary judgment motion. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on June 13, 2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
June 12, 2008 Filing 123 BRIEF re: #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1, #2 Appendix Part 2, #3 Appendix Part 3, #4 Appendix Part 4, #5 Appendix Part 5, A, #6 Appendix Part 5, B, #7 Appendix Part 6, #8 Appendix Part 7, #9 Appendix Part 8, #10 Appendix Part 9, #11 Appendix Part 10, #12 Appendix Part 11, #13 Appendix Part 12, #14 Appendix Part 13, #15 Appendix Part 14, A, #16 Appendix Part 14, B, #17 Appendix Part 15, A, #18 Appendix Part 15, B, #19 Appendix Part 16)(Schnadig, Richard)
June 12, 2008 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Sanford, David)
June 12, 2008 Filing 121 RESPONSE re: #111 Rule 56.1 Statement,,, (Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation's Responses To Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Their Motion For Summary Judgment). Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Schnadig, Richard)
June 12, 2008 Filing 120 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #102 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Sanford, David)
June 12, 2008 Filing 119 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes.(Sanford, David)
June 12, 2008 Filing 118 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David Sanford dated 6/6/08 re: Request for an extension of two days for each side to file their Oppositions, making the new deadline June 12th, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: "So Ordered." (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/9/08) (rjm)
June 9, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/12/2008 (rjm)
May 22, 2008 Filing 116 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #103 MOTION To Bar Plaintiff's Expert Brian T. Farrington.. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Schnadig, Richard)
May 16, 2008 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #103 MOTION To Bar Plaintiff's Expert Brian T. Farrington.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Sanford, David)
May 6, 2008 Filing 111 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, part 1, #3 Exhibit 2, part 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37)(Sanford, David)
May 6, 2008 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, 1, #2 Appendix A, 2, #3 Appendix B, 1, #4 Appendix B, 2, #5 Appendix B, 3, #6 Appendix B, 4, #7 Appendix C, #8 Appendix D, #9 Appendix E, #10 Appendix F)(Sanford, David)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Richard H. Schnadig dated 5/2/08 re: The parties respectively request that they file one Opposition, due on 6/10/08 rather than the dates for Replies and Responses currently set. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. ( Responses due by 6/10/2008) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/6/08) (rjm)
May 2, 2008 Filing 115 APPENDIX to Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment. Volume III. This Document relates to All Actions. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(rjm)
May 2, 2008 Filing 114 APPENDIX to Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment. Volume II. This Document relates to All Actions. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(rjm)
May 2, 2008 Filing 113 APPENDIX to Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment. #100 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Volume I. This Document relates to All Actions.(rjm)
May 2, 2008 Filing 108 DECLARATION of David Sanford re: #107 Rule 56.1 Statement,,,. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Sanford, David)
May 2, 2008 Filing 107 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 37, #2 Appendix 36, #3 Exhibit 35, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 33, #6 Exhibit 32, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 30, #9 Exhibit 29, #10 Exhibit 28, #11 Exhibit 27, #12 Exhibit 26, #13 Exhibit 25, #14 Exhibit 24, #15 Exhibit 23, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 20, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 15, #24 Exhibit 14, #25 Exhibit 13, #26 Exhibit 12, #27 Exhibit 11, #28 Exhibit 10, #29 Exhibit 9, #30 Exhibit 8, #31 Exhibit 7, #32 Exhibit 6, #33 Exhibit 5, #34 Exhibit 4, #35 Exhibit 3, #36 Exhibit 1)(Sanford, David) Modified on 5/19/2008 (kco).
May 2, 2008 Filing 106 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix F, #2 Appendix E, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix B-4, #5 Appendix B-3, #6 Appendix B-2, #7 Appendix B-1, #8 Appendix A-2, #9 Appendix A-1)(Sanford, David) Modified on 5/19/2008 (kco).
May 2, 2008 Filing 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes.(Sanford, David)
May 2, 2008 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #103 MOTION To Bar Plaintiff's Expert Brian T. Farrington.. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B part 2)(Schnadig, Richard)
May 2, 2008 Filing 103 MOTION To Bar Plaintiff's Expert Brian T. Farrington. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Schnadig, Richard)
May 2, 2008 Filing 102 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Schnadig, Richard)
May 2, 2008 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 part 2 of 3, #2 part 3 of 3)(Schnadig, Richard)
May 2, 2008 Filing 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Schnadig, Richard)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Richard H. Schnadig dated 4/29/08 re: request for permission for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. to file its Appendix in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment in paper form... the size of its Appendix may be too large to be filed on the Court's electronic system. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/30/08) (rjm)
April 14, 2008 Filing 97 JOINT STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) -Carol Bollinger- against Defendant(s) -Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation- in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/14/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David Sanford dated March 26, 2008 re: Leave to extend the page limits on dispostive motions due on May 2, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: While I want a full and thorough record, I do not wish 50 pages. The application is denied, but the Court will allow the supporting memo to be 35 pages, the response 35 pages, and the reply 15 pages. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on March 27, 2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David Sanford dated 3/7/08 re: We are jointly recommending that the Case Management Plan be modified as reflected below beginning with the March 3 date. ENDORSEMENT: "So Ordered." ( All merits Discovery, including expert depositions due by 3/15/2008., Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2008., Responses due by 6/2/2008, Replies due by 6/20/2008.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/10/08) (rjm)
February 27, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 2/27/2008. REMARK: Status conference held. Visit http://www1.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php - - with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Court flow". Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
February 26, 2008 Calendar Entry: ***Conference Reminder*** PTC set for Wednesday, February 27, 2008 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty (By - Marlon Ovalles - CRD). Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
January 31, 2008 Filing 94 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... that pursuant to FRCP 41, any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) -Theresa Castro- against Defendant(s) -Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation- in the captioned lawsuits shall be dismissed by the Court with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/31/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
January 11, 2008 Filing 92 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) -Lisa Oepkes- against Defendant(s) -Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.- in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/11/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
January 11, 2008 Filing 91 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) -Jean Tarantino- against Defendant(s) -Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.- in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/11/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
January 11, 2008 Filing 90 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) -Daniel Hoffman- against Defendant(s) -Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.- in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/11/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
January 8, 2008 Filing 93 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Richard H. Schnadig dated 12/21/07 re: on behalf of both parties in the referenced litigation per the Court's request to review the procedural posture of MDL cases after the completion of pretrial proceedings. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(rjm)
January 2, 2008 Filing 89 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... that pursuant to FRCP 41, any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) -Shelley Saunders- against Defendant(s) -Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation- in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/2/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
January 2, 2008 Filing 88 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... that pursuant to FRCP 41, any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) -Michelle Chalupka- against Defendant(s) -Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation- in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/2/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
January 2, 2008 Filing 87 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... that pursuant to FRCP 41, any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) -Janet Ashendon- against Defendant(s) -Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation- in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/2/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
January 2, 2008 Filing 86 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE... that pursuant to FRCP 41, any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) -Edward Blanchon- against Defendant(s) -Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation- in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/2/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
December 21, 2007 Filing 85 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Richard H. Schnadig dated 12/21/07 re: Civil Case Management Plan schedule revision. ENDORSEMENT: The civil case management plan is amended in accordance with the dates set forth in this letter., ( Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2008 at 11:30 AM before Judge Paul A. Crotty., Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2008., Responses due by 6/2/2008, Replies due by 6/20/2008.) and as further set forth in said Endorsed Letter. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/21/07) (rjm)
December 17, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: REMARK: The Court will read and review letter briefs from the parties with respect to the "California Cases". The parties directed to meet and confer on a revised civil case management plan and submit it to the court for approval. The next conference is scheduled for Wednesday, February 27, 2008 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20-C. See transcript for complete details of this electronically recorded proceeding. Visit http://www1.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php - - with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Courtflow").Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/17/2007, (Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2008 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David Sanford dated 11/01/2007 re: Requesting a conference pursuant to the Court's Rule 3(B) regarding defendant Novartis Pharmaceutical Corporation failure to respond o Plaintiffs' repeated request of (1) identification of witness, (2) designation of appropriate 30(b)(6) witnesses for deposition, and (3) responses to discovery requests relating to Novartis use of outside consultants. ENDORSEMENT: The parties should again meet and confer to resolve all difficulties concerning discovery. If they are unable to do so, the Court will convene a conference on November 19 or 20 at the parties convenience. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/05/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty - c/o Mr. Marlon Ovalles from Richard H. Schnadig dated 10/24/2007 re: Paragraph 8 (c) of the CCMP correctly recites that depositions are to be completed on December 31, 2007. However, no change was made in paragraph 7 relating to the close of fact discovery (other than expert discovery) which incorrectly remained October 31, 2007. ENDORSEMENT: The dates on this letter will be incorporated into the Civil Case Management Plan and the dates in the plan will be adjusted accordingly. So Ordered. Discovery due by 12/31/2007. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/29/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
October 15, 2007 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Robert Weinstein on behalf of Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger (Weinstein, William)
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER... Depositions to be completed by 12/31/07. Requests to Admit to be served no later than 7/2/07. Experts, if any, are to be designated by plaintiffs by 11/30/07 and any reports furnished by 12/31/07. Any experts of defendants shall be designated by 12/31/07 and any reports furnished by 1/31/08. Experts may be deposed, but such depositions must occur by 2/29/08. Despositive Motions, if any, due by 3/31/2008., Responses due by 4/30/2008, Replies due by 5/19/2008., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2007 at 02:15 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty., Ready for Trial by 10/13/2008... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this Revised Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/28/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
October 1, 2007 Filing 80 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Richard H. Schnadig dated 09/26/2007 re: Revised CCMP. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the parties agreement on a schedule for dispositive motions, which will be fully briefed by May 19, 2008 (see #11) the Court and the parties will meet and confer on trial dates, and pretrial submissions, should that prove necessary following the Courts decision on the dispositive motions. Accordingly paragraph 15 is stricken.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 09/28/2007) (Attachments: #1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CONSENT ORDER (this document relates to all actions): this action is Dismissed with prejudice as against defendants Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, and Novartis Services, Inc. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 8/21/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(kkc)
July 31, 2007 Filing 78 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
July 31, 2007 Filing 77 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
July 20, 2007 Filing 76 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
July 20, 2007 Filing 75 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
July 13, 2007 Filing 74 STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) -Elizabeth Kelso- against Defendant(s) -Novartis Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Services Inc., and Novartis Finance Corporation- in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/13/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
July 13, 2007 Filing 73 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
July 13, 2007 Filing 72 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
July 13, 2007 Filing 71 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
June 28, 2007 Filing 70 STIPULATED DISMISSAL... that Christine Vaughn hereby dismisses her claims without prejudice against Novartis Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., and Novartis Finance Corporation. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/28/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
June 22, 2007 Filing 69 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
June 22, 2007 Filing 68 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
June 18, 2007 Filing 66 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (19 in 1:06-cv-11475-PAC, 65 in 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 32 in 1:06-md-01794-PAC) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Fitzpatrick, Vincent)
June 15, 2007 Filing 65 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeremy Heisler dated 6/14/07 re: Plaintiffs respectfully request that Your Honor endorse this letter so that the Appendix of Exhibits described which have been temporarily filed under seal, may remain under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/15/07) (rjm)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... Terminated Motion(s): (36 in 1:06-md-01794-PAC) JOINT MOTION for Protective Order. filed by Novartis Finance Corporation, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Catherine White, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Minel Hider Tobertga, Novartis Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT ON SIGNITURE PAGE: The reason for the delay in signing is that these papers were not properly filed. The parties are reminded to follow the ECF rules when making any filings. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 06/12/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
June 6, 2007 Filing 63 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
June 6, 2007 Filing 62 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
May 31, 2007 Filing 61 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
May 31, 2007 Filing 60 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
May 31, 2007 Filing 59 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
May 23, 2007 Filing 58 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
May 23, 2007 Filing 57 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
May 18, 2007 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (19 in 1:06-cv-11475-PAC, 65 in 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 32 in 1:06-md-01794-PAC) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Carol Bollinger, Simona Lopes, Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger, Minel Hider Tobertga. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Wittels, Steven)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Crotty from Angela Corridan dated 05/18/2007 re: page limitation endorsement of May 17, 2007. ENDORSEMENT: The request is denied and the reply is still limited to 10 pages. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 05/18/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Crotty from Angela Corridan dated 05/17/2007 re: (10) page expansion of the page limit of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Summary Judgment Motion...Thus...Plaintiffs' page limit would be twenty-five (25) pages. Correspondingly, Defendants would receive twenty (20) pages to reply to Plaintiffs Opposition. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff to file a response of 25 pages is granted, and defendants reply is limited to 10 pages. The time extension agreed to is adopted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 05/17/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
May 11, 2007 Filing 52 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
May 11, 2007 Filing 51 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
May 11, 2007 Filing 50 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
May 4, 2007 Filing 49 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
May 4, 2007 Filing 48 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
May 4, 2007 Filing 47 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
May 4, 2007 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
May 1, 2007 Filing 45 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David Sanford dated 4/30/07 re: Granted request for extension of time (two weeks) for Plaintiffs to file their opposition to Defts. Novartis Corp., Novartis Services, Inc., and Novartis Finance Corp.'s Motion for Summary Judgment.Response due by 5/14/2007 (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/1/07) (rjm)
April 30, 2007 Filing 44 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
April 30, 2007 Filing 43 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
April 30, 2007 Filing 42 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
April 30, 2007 Filing 41 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
April 30, 2007 Filing 40 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
April 30, 2007 Filing 39 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
April 30, 2007 Filing 38 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger.(Sanford, David)
April 30, 2007 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
April 24, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty : Remark: Defense counsel, Mr. Fitzpatrick, shall report the status of document production, in writing, by Tuesday, May 8, 2007. Plaintiffs can respond accordingly (Visit http://www1.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding (start time 16:48-47- visit http://www1.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge_info.php?id=91 with respect to Judge Crottys Individual Practices ).Status Conference held on 4/24/2007. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
April 24, 2007 ***CORRECTION*** Remark: Defense counsel for Novartis Pharmaceuticals, Richard Schnadig, shall report the status of document production, in writing, by Tuesday, May 8, 2007. Plaintiffs can respond accordingly (Visit http://www1.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding (start time 16:48-47- visit http://www1.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge_info.php?id=91 with respect to Judge Crottys Individual Practices ). Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(mov)
April 20, 2007 Calendar Entry:, Set/Reset Hearings (set via email by chambers): Status Conference set for 4/24/2007 12:15 PM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (mov)
April 4, 2007 Filing 36 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Novartis Corporation, Simona Lopes, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Carol Bollinger.(Wexler, Jonathan)
April 2, 2007 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment, Memorandum of Law and Exhibits in Support of its Motion Summary Judgment, Statement of Uncontested Material Facts on 4/2/2007. Document filed by Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Fitzpatrick, Vincent)
April 2, 2007 Filing 34 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Fitzpatrick, Vincent)
April 2, 2007 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (19 in 1:06-cv-11475-PAC, 65 in 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 32 in 1:06-md-01794-PAC) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Fitzpatrick, Vincent)
April 2, 2007 Filing 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(Fitzpatrick, Vincent)
March 30, 2007 Filing 31 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Related document: 30 Amended Complaint filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga.(Wexler, Jonathan)
March 29, 2007 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc..(McDevitt, Heather)
March 29, 2007 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (62 in 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 27 in 1:06-md-01794-PAC) MOTION for Leave to File.. Document filed by Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC(McDevitt, Heather)
March 29, 2007 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer. Document filed by Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC(McDevitt, Heather)
March 21, 2007 Filing 26 STIPULATED DISMISSAL... that Darryl Copeland hereby dismisses his claims with prejudice against Novartis Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Services Inc., and Novartis Finance Corporation. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/21/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
March 21, 2007 Filing 25 STIPULATED DISMISSAL... that Molly McVey hereby dismisses her claims without prejudice against Novartis Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Services Inc., and Novartis Finance Corporation. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/21/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
March 21, 2007 Filing 24 STIPULATED DISMISSAL... that Amy DeFranze hereby dismisses her claims without prejudice against Novartis Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Services Inc., and Novartis Finance Corporation. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/21/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
March 21, 2007 Filing 23 STIPULATED DISMISSAL that Elissa Ritt hereby dismisses her claims without prejudice against Novartis Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Services Inc., and Novartis Finance Corporation. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/21/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
March 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Novartis' Motion for summary judgment due by 4/2/2007.,Responses due by 4/30/2007,Replies due by 5/15/2007. Depositions to be completed by 10/31/07. Requests to admit to be served no later than 7/2/07. Experts, if any, are to be designated by ptffs. by 10/31/07 and any reports furnished by 11/30/07. Any experts of defts. shall be designated by 11/30/07 and any reports furnished by 12/31/07. Experts may be deposed, but such depositions must occur by 1/31/08. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by 2/15/08. Answering papers are to be served & filed by 3/17/08. Reply papers are to be served and filed by 4/2/08... and as further set forth regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of Revised Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/12/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
February 20, 2007 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Wexler, Jonathan)
February 20, 2007 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Novartis Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc..(Fitzpatrick, Vincent)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Certifying Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action, Rule 23 Class Actions and Approving Notice... Regarding the Procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of the Order Certifying Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action, Rule 23 Class Actions and Approving Notice... and as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
February 14, 2007 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 JOINT MOTION For Order Certifying FLSA Collective Action, Certifying Rule 23 Class Actions And Approving Notice.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Novartis Corporation, Simona Lopes, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Carol Bollinger. (Wexler, Jonathan)
February 14, 2007 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION For Order Certifying FLSA Collective Action, Certifying Rule 23 Class Actions And Approving Notice. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Novartis Corporation, Simona Lopes, Novartis Finance Corporation, Novartis Services, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Carol Bollinger.(Wexler, Jonathan)
February 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney David W. Sanford for Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga, Simona Lopes, Carol Bollinger admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/14/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REVISED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER:Novartis' Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/31/2007, Responses due by 4/30/2007, Replies due by 5/15/2007. Discovery due by 10/31/2007. Depositions due by 6/30/07... and as further set forth in said Order (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
February 2, 2007 Filing 14 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David Sanford dated 2/1/07 re: Granted request for plaintiffs to appear telephonically during status conference that will take place on 2/6/07, 2:30pm. Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2007 02:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty."Counsel shall call phone number (212) 805-6302 at 2:30pm." (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/2/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC(rjm)
February 1, 2007 Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga.(rjm)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER in case 1:06-cv-02268-PAC; granting (11) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:06-md-01794-PAC; granting (6) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:06-cv-11475-PAC. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/1/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
January 31, 2007 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga. (Wittels, Steven)
January 31, 2007 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga.(Wittels, Steven)
January 31, 2007 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Steven Lance Wittels to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. #10 First Amended Complaint. This document is not filed via ECF. (kg)
January 30, 2007 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of Filing of First Amended Complaint (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT). Document filed by Catherine White, Minel Hider Tobertga. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of First Amended Complaint)(Wittels, Steven) Modified on 1/31/2007 (Allen, Kathleen).
January 17, 2007 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Jeanine Kagay on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Kagay, Sara)
January 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Sara J. Kagay for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/12/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC, 1:06-cv-02268-PAC, 1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm)
December 11, 2006 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/28/06 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (tro, )
December 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER... Regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of the Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order of this Court in accordance with Rule 16(f), Fed. R. Civ. P. Amended Pleadings (motion to amend or join additional parties) due by 1/30/2007. Motions (for summary judgment on the issue of corporate separateness) due by 2/28/2007. All Discovery due by 6/30/2007. Initial Disclosure purs. to Rule 26(a)(1) due 1/30/07. Fact discovery limited to the issue of relationship between defts. due 1/30/07. Discovery - initial requests for production of documents to be served no later than 1/1/07. Discovery - interrogatories to be served no later than 1/1/07. Discovery - depositions to be completed no later than 6/30/07. Discovery - requests to admit relating to class to be served no later than 3/1/07. All expert discovery to be completed no later than 9/30/07. Parties to meet to confer on schedule for expert disclosures no later than 5/31/07. All briefing papers on dispositive motions by 12/15/07... and as further set forth in said Civil Case Mgt. Plan and Scheduling Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/4/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC,1:06-cv-02268-PAC,1:06-cv-11475-PAC(rjm, )
December 1, 2006 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Schnadig, Richard)
November 28, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/28/2006. (rjm, )
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 (this document relates to all cases); 1. All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form. Forms can be found on the court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov.2. All attorneys who wish to be admitted for purposes of this case shall send a motion to be admitted pro hac vice to John Sacco at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, Room 249, New York, NY 10007. In addition to the documentation required by the Local Rules for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, Civil Rule 1.3, attorneys wishing to appear pro hac vice must also include with their motion a check for $25.00 payable to the Clerk of the Court and a completed CM/ECF attorney registration form. 3. All documents filed in the MDL case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov.4. Amended complaints and supplemental pleadings shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action or actions to which they are being added. Similarly, a filing removing parties shall indicate the parties being removed and the action or actions from which they are being removed. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/28/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01794-PAC,1:06-cv-02268-PAC,1:06-cv-11475-PAC(kkc, )
November 28, 2006 Case Designated ECF. (kkc, )
November 26, 2006 Calendar Entry: Please take notice that the November 28, 2006 at 10:30 a.m IPTC will take place in Courtroom 6-A located at 500 Pearl NOT 20-C. Please notify your adversary of this update. Submitted by: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy to the Honorable Paul A. Crotty (mov, ) (mov, )
November 13, 2006 Filing 3 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jonathan A. Wexler dated 11/10/06 re: Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporations' request to reschedule status conference currently scheduled for 12/4/06, 2:00 PM. Status Conference set for 11/28/2006 10:30 AM before Judge Paul A. Crotty. This Document relates to 06cv2268. Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/13/06) (rjm, ).
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER (This document pertains to: 06 cv 2268); This matter has been scheduled for a status conference on 12/4/06 at 2:00 pm, Courtroon 20-C, 500 Pearl St. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/8/06) (sn) Modified on 11/9/2006 (sn).
November 8, 2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/4/2006 02:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (sn)
October 31, 2006 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the action listed on the Order and pending in the Central District of California, case no. 2:06-cv-2764 and the same hereby is transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Paul A. Crotty, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/30/2006) (kkc, )
October 31, 2006 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (kkc, )
October 31, 2006 CASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:06-cv-2268 (PAC). (kkc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Novartis Wage and Hour Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick J. Toan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaila Jo Kirbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Gilman Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hartlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Ann Spagnoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bradshaw Picklesimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brice Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnna Marie Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allen Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lawrence Woodcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danida Sotarovska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chriscelle Queen Merquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Robert Stiglich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley Erin Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AnnaKay R. Monaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exie Ramona Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Beauchamp Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald David Oehlbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey R. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Studley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Sutton Eager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurie Christopher Tayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Allison Murtagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Sislow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Howard Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andra Bloom Wildstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Basilone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry F. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Michael Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn M. Monachino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Lee (Barstad) Lindaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Beth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adena Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Patrick Tafelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott David Trapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Enloid Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl R. Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Thomas Wetmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia J. Heunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Joan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Wayne Rinker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marybeth K. Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Matthew Druhot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wayne Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Louise Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Fletcher Chasteen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela C. Reppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alissa Hope Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Michael Zamloot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Oepkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon J. Brown-Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Dawn Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Lynn Langhorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Kevin York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Reginald Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Robert Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie R. Luczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wiah Theodore Dogbeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael V. Dalton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Thomas Navarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Robert Tees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Glen Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bernard Ryberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Joseph Silverstrim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maleia Patricia James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davina Kullar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston M. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Gavin McMonigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolleen L. Farge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen William Lundquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Lynn Falzetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony William Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Wayne Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Liberatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Herren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Dalia Plonczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Ekdeshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Elizabeth Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen S. Fouts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Rochelle Dickaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal G. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina R. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D. Nero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Dalabakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elane G. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra E. Hickey Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Amaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian W. Bunkelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David John Pacic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony P. Stano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lynn Roseborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thomas Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Lamar Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Scott Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Pierre Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Christine Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manan Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Callahan Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolie Marisa Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Jeanine Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Marie Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Pantoja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Jean Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Piscitelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Ann Klaviter-Dauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Marlene Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Anne Eggleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Lynett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lee Rican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Andrew Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Stephen Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Benz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Miglieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Lewis Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Kakavas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane E. Luby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Dominic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Joseph Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly T. Bentsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Martin Comeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana H. LaPorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John G. Sin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Michelle Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth K. Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Lynn Napier-Linle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Eppley Lindeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Riddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helga Nemaric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simona Maria Lopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher James Rosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Nicole Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark David Stahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Michael Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Manfredini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd S. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Michael Hrovat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Renee Millar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne M. Drayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Christopher Lapine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Conover Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Harl Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrio Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minel Hider Tobertga
Represented By: Steven Lance Wittels
Represented By: David W. Sanford
Represented By: Jeremy Heisler
Represented By: Grant E. Morris
Represented By: William Robert Weinstein
Represented By: Ronald P. Ackerman
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Wexler
Represented By: Angela Corridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward F. Staats, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Lynn Gresling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Ann Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Harold Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Nick Yaremcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank J. Perroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ann Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lampe Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Delores Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Romain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ann Stecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie H. Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Marie Andvesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Dawn Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Suzzane (Sharp) Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Edward Feroli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Megan Sylvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Joel Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Erwin Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyla West Brimberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Sue Lottes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Garrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Douglas Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt R. Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Claire Barshinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casie Lea Akerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent J. Concklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Harold Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Polinar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. DeSantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Troy Luginbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald D. Scurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Richard Saenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrod W. Maloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Richard Galmines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul David Cordecca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna D. Loughrige-Bergamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nestor G. Lubowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James John McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryna G. Chalef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alesia Rachelle Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jeffrey Burson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Marie Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer W. Donley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Marie Wickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Marie Rowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Edward Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle C. Chalupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott J. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara (Inselstein) Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Leigh Bentson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer P. Klearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Douglas Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ann (Pearlstein) Mair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly J. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniella Cristina Deseta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santhre Murray Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Rhonda Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ekstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Marie Sports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Serles Van Fleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Jerome Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly B. Pens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Renee Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Brown Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy E. Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold David Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neha Ankoor Naik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Ann Belfiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Patrick Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas James Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Melvin Bedford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Edward Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer A. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Richard Gelbuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather D'Ann Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassi Kris Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penni Lynn Zelinkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Trubetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey W. Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen M. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanna Dampier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Dawn Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Frank Byler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tajinder Singh Kalsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings<