Naranjo et al v. Verizon New York, Inc.
Plaintiff: Blanca Naranjo and Angel Naranjo
Defendant: New Libert y Plaza LP (Owner), Ann Taylor Stores Corporation, 140 West Street (Verizon Building), Brown Brothers Harriman & co., Inc. (Agent), Verizon New York, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Lehman Brothers Inc., Kasco Restoraton Services, Co. (Contractor), WFP Tower A. Co. L.P. (Owner), American Express Travel Related Service Company, Inc. (Owner), Related BPC Associates, Inc. (owner), Lehman Commercial Papers, Inc. (Owner), Kibel Companies (Owner), DB Private Clients Corporation, Tully Construction Co., Inc. (Contractor), WFP Tower D. Co. L.P. (Owner), The Bank of New York Trust Company NA (Owner), 200 Vesey Street (Three World Financial Center), 200 Liberty Street (One World Financial Center), Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Castastophe, Inc., World Financial Properties, L.P. (Owner), New York University (owner), Related Management Group, Inc. (Owner), Battery Park City Authority (owner), Nomura Securities International, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Structure Tone (UK), Inc. (contractor), Sabine Zerarka (owner), tam 140 West Street (Verizon Building), Board of Education of The City of New York (Owner), Ann Taylor Stores Corporation (Owner), WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp., New York City Industrial Development Corporation (Owner), WFP Tower A Co. L.P., GPS Environmental Consultants, Inc. (agent/contractor), Trammell Crow Company (Agent), WFP Tower D Co. L.P., New York Telephone Company (Agent), WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner), American Stock Exchange Realty Associates, LLC, Nomura Holding America, Inc., BT Private Clients Corp., American Express Bank, LTD (Owner), WFP Retail Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner), American Stock Exchange Clearing, LLC, McClier Corporation (agent), Nomura Holding America Inc. (Owner), Hillman Environmental Group, LLC. (agent/contractor), Related Management Co., LP (Owner), Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, WFP Tower D Holding 1 G.P. Corp. (Owner), Thames Realty Co. (owner), Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Related BPC Associates, Inc., BFP Tower C. MM LLC. (Owner), 100 Trinity Place (Hig School Of Ecomomics and Finance), Hudson View East Condominum (Owner), FGP 90 West Street, Inc. (Owner), 250 Vesley Street (Four World Financial Center), General Reinsurance Corporation, The City of New York (Owner), Brookfield Financial Properties L.P. (Owner), Brookfield Properties Corporation (Owner), Verizon Properties, Inc., One Liberty Plaza (Owner), American Express Travel Realted Services Company, Inc., The Related Companies, LP, Board of Managers of the Hudson View East Condominium (Owner), New York City Industrial Development Agency (Owner), BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC., 37 Wall, Inc (Owner), WFP Tower D Co., G.P. Corp. (owner), WFP Retail Co. L.P. (owner), New York City Industrial Development Agency, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Trammell Crow Corporation Services, Inc. (Agent), Bankers Trust Corporation, American Express Company (Owner), 345 Chambers Street (Stuyvesant Hight School), 90 West Street (West Street Building), Bankers Trust Corporation (Owner), WFP One Liberty Plaza CO., L.P. (Owner), 40 Rector Street, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc. (owner), Structure Tone Global Services, Inc. (contractor), Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (Owner), 63 Wall Street Inc. (Owner), Related Management Company, LP, Nomura Securities International Inc. (Owner), WFP Tower A. Co. (Owner), The American Stock Exchange, L.L.C., Verizon Communications, Inc., Envirotech Clean Air, Inc. (Contractor), WFP Retail Co. L.P., The One Liberty Plaza Condominium (Condo #178) (Owner), National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc. (Owner), WFP Tower D Holding Co. 11 L.P. (Owner), Lehman Commercial Paper Inc., 250 South End Avenue (Hudson View East), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., The Related Realty Group, Inc., Lehman Brothers, Inc. (Owner), Brookfield Properties Holdings Inc. (Owner), Toscorp. Inc. (Owner), Weston Solutions, Inc. (agent/contractor), American Express Bank Ltd, Liberty View Associates, L.P. (Owner), WFP Tower D. Holding Co. 1 L.P. (Owner), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, Tribeca Landing L.L.C., RY Management Co., Inc., BT Private Clients Corp. (Owner), 130 Liberty Street (Deutsche Bank Building)., Brookfield Financial Properties Inc. (Owner), Battery Park City Authority, American Express Company, Trammel Crow Company, WFP Tower B Holding Co. LP (Owner), Rockrose Development Corp. (Owner), Hudson View Towers Associates (Owner), Alan Kasman DBA Kasco (contractor), WFP Tower B Co. L.P. (Owner), RY Management Co., Inc. (Owner), National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc., Tucker Anthony, Inc., WFP Tower B Co. L.P., Deutsche Bank Trust Company (Owner), Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Inc., WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp., FGP 90 West Street Inc., 30 West Braodway, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Weston Solutions Inc., 63 Wall Street, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Owner), BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., LLC (Owner), 225 Rector Place (Parc Place), New York City School Construction Authority (Owner), WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp., Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (Owner), The City University Of New York Owner, BFP Tower C Co. LLC (Owner), The Board Of Managers Of The One Liberty Plaza Condominium (Condo #1178) (Owner), New York University, Brookfield Partners LP (Owner), General Re Services Corp (Owner/Agent), Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (Owner), Indoor Environmental Technology, Inc. (agent/contractor), Tucker Anthony, Inc. (Agent), PS. 234 Independence School, Liberty View Associates, LP., Department of Business Services (Agent), Structure Tone Global Services, Inc., Tishman Interiors Corporation (contractor) and WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp. (owner)
Undetermined: Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman, Board of Managers of Hudson View East Condominium and Hudson View East Condominium
Case Number: 1:2007cv00066
Filed: January 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 49:40101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christopher R. LoPalo to RE-FILE re: Document No. #103 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Court's leave has not been granted. Battery Park City Authority is a terminated party. Add Battery Park City Authority to CM ECF. Add Blanca Coronel to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (pc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 103 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE -AMENDED AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 69 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, against Battery Park City Authority with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Angel Naranjo. Related document: 69 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(LoPalo, Christopher) Modified on 3/21/2019 (pc).
July 25, 2018 Filing 101 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe and Weston Solutions, Inc. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street ("Two World Financial Center") and 250 Vesey Street ("Four World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (jwh)
July 24, 2018 Filing 102 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001. at the premises located at 200 Vesey Street ("Three World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/24/2018) (ama)
June 7, 2018 Filing 100 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp.(f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. LP., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower CMM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; Battery Park City Authority; and BMS Catastrophe, Inc. s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to Include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, testing, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 200 Liberty Street ("One World Financial Center") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/07/2018).*** Party BFP Tower C Co. LLC (Owner), BFP Tower C. MM LLC. (Owner), Brookfield Partners LP (Owner), Brookfield Properties Corporation (Owner), Brookfield Properties Holdings Inc. (Owner), New Liberty Plaza LP (Owner), One Liberty Plaza (Owner), WFP One Liberty Plaza CO., L.P. (Owner), WFP One Liberty Plaza CO., L.P. (Owner), WFP Retail Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner), WFP Tower A. Co. (Owner), WFP Tower D Holding 1 G.P. Corp. (Owner), WFP Tower D Holding Co. 11 L.P. (Owner), WFP Tower D. Holding Co. 1 L.P. (Owner), 200 Liberty Street (One World Financial Center) and BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., LLC (Owner) terminated. (ama) Modified on 6/25/2018 (ama).
June 7, 2018 Filing 99 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against RBC Dain Rauscher Inc. f/k/a Tucker Anthony, Inc., only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at One World Financial Center (200 Liberty Street) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/7/2018). (rjm)
June 5, 2018 Filing 98 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Brookfield Office Properties Inc., Brookfield Asset Management Inc., Brookfield Properties OLP Co. LLC (f/k/a BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Properties One WFC Co. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. L.P.), Brookfield Properties One WFC G.P. Corp.(f/k/a WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.), WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.), BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D. Co. G.P. LLC (f/k/a WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.) and WFP Retail Co. L.P.; BMS Catastrophe, Inc, s/h/a Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastrophe, Inc. d/b/a BMS Catastrophe; and Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but' not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery, operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, testing, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 165 Broadway ("One Liberty Plaza") in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. WFP Tower A. Co. L.P. (Owner), WFP Tower B Holding Co. LP (Owner), Brookfield Financial Properties Inc. (Owner) and WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner) terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/5/2018) (kgo)
May 2, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew William Amend on behalf of Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. New Address: New York State Office of the Attorney General, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, 10005, 212-416-8022. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(Amend, Andrew)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Hillmann Entities including but not limited to Hillmann Environmental Group, LLC only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center) in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and the dismissal is without costs. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/21/2017) (ras)
June 29, 2017 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #96 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sac)
June 9, 2017 Filing 95 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against Liberty View Associates, L.P., Related BPC Associates, Inc., The Related Realty Group, Inc., Related Management Co., L.P., and The Related Companies, L.P. only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, on and/or after September 11, 2001, at the premises located at 225 Rector Place a.k.a. Parc Place in New York, New York, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/9/2017) (mro)
March 29, 2017 Filing 94 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): 1. All claims by Plaintiff(s) against FGP 90 West Street, Inc. and FGP 90 West Street, LLC, only, arising out of or relating in any way to include all conduct, including, but not limited to, the debris handling, clean up, volunteer work, rescue/recovery operations, destruction or removal of documents and other physical objects, scanning and preservation of documents and other physical objects, testing, evaluation, abatement, remediation, construction, deconstruction, excavation and demolition operations, at the premises located at 90 West Street, New York, New York, on and/or after September 11, 2001, are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice; and 2. The dismissal is without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/29/2017) (mro)
May 17, 2016 Filing 92 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO DEFENDANT, AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY, AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, LTD AND AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES COMPANY, INC., LEHMAN BROTHERS, INC., LEHMAN COMMERICAL PAPER, INC. LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS, INC., McCLIER CORPORATION, TRAMMEL CROW CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. and TRAMMEL CROW COMPANY, ONLY FOR THE CASES LISTED IN THE ATTACHED "EXHIBIT A": that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted against defendants AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY, AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, LTD AND AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES COMPANY, INC., LEHMAN BROTHERS, INC., LEHMAN COMMERICAL PAPER, INC. LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS, INC., McCLIER CORPORATION, TRAMMEL CROW CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. and TRAMMEL CROW COMPANY, as to the claims being made as to the premises located at 3 World Financial Center, New York, New York, shall be and the same hereby are discontinued with prejudice without costs to any party as against the other. American Express Bank, Ltd, American Express Company, American Express Travel Realted Services Company, Inc., Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Lehman Brothers Inc., Lehman Commercial Paper Inc., McClier Corporation, Trammel Crow Company, Trammell Crow Corporate Services, Inc., terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/17/2016) (tn)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENTS IN 640 CASES: the motion to approve the settlements is GRANTED. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 6070) terminated. Accordingly, the Clerk shall dismiss with prejudice the Complaints of the plaintiffs listed in Exhibit 2, attached hereto, and close their cases, subject to restoration by any party if settlements are not finalized. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/10/2016) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-1, #2 Exhibit 2-2, #3 Exhibit 2-3, #4 Exhibit 2-4, #5 Exhibit 2-5)(anc)
April 16, 2015 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Rockrose Development Corp. (Owner) served on 11/29/2007, answer due 12/20/2007. Service was accepted by Frank Scanga - Attorney. Document filed by Angel Naranjo. (LoPalo, Christopher)
April 13, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2015. (tn)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING BATTERY PARK CITY AUTHORITY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re: (Doc. No. 5751 in 21mc102): that BPCA's motion is GRANTED and the claims against BPCA brought by the 171 plaintiffs listed in the attached schedule are dismissed. The Plaintiffs shall amend their Complaints by May 11, 2015. BPCA need not amend its Answer. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 5751) terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/13/2015) ***As per chambers, filed in 21mc102 and all cases listed on Schedule A. (tn)
April 2, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew William Amend on behalf of Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. (Amend, Andrew)
June 11, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Indoor Environmental Technology, Inc. (agent/contractor). (Pollack, David)
May 29, 2013 Filing 87 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO DEFENDANTS, B.C.R.E. 90 WEST ST, LLC AND THE KIBEL COMPANIES, ONLY. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned for the parties in the cases listed in the attached exhibit, that whereas no party herein is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action and based on the representation of the within defendants, and to the extent of Plaintiff(s) can so Stipulate that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against Defendants B.C.R.E. 90 WEST ST, LLC and THE KIBEL COMPANIES, only as to the claims being made as to the premises located at 90 West Street, New York New York and for the cases listed in the attached exhibit shall be and the same hereby are discontinued without prejudice without costs to any party as against the other. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that should evidence be discovered throughout the course of the litigation which determines that B.C.R.E. 90 WEST ST, LLC and THE KIBEL COMPANIES are proper parties to this suit, that Plaintiff(s) may reinstitute the action without regard to the applicable Statute of Limitations, assuming said original action was timely commenced, and in such instance Defendants shall not assert a Statute of Limitation as a defense. This Stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/28/2013). (rjm)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION: Please take notice, that McGivney & Kluger, P.C. 80 Broad Street, 23rd Floor, New York, New York 10004, has been substituted as counsel in place and stead of Callan, Koster, Brady & Brennan, LLP. as attorneys for defendants Hudson View East Condominium and Board of Managers of the Hudson View East Condominium in the 21 MC 102 Docket for the Civil Action Numbers listed in Exhibit "A" attached hereto. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/7/2013) (js) Modified on 3/12/2013 (js).
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the above-entitled actions, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above-entitled actions be, and the same hereby are discontinued without prejudice, only as against defendant Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, formerly known as Bankers Trust Corporation and Bankers Trust New York Corporation, without costs to either party as against the other. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that should evidence be discovered throughout the course of the litigation which determines that Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation is a proper party to these suits, plaintiffs listed in Schedule A may reinstitute these actions without regard to the applicable statute of limitations, assuming said original actions were timely commenced, and in such instance these defendants shall not assert the statute of limitations as a defense This stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/19/2013) (djc)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the above entitled actions, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled actions be, and the same hereby are discontinued without prejudice, only as as against defendant Bankers Trust Corporation, now known as Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, without costs to either party as against the other. It is hereby further stipulated and agreed, that should evidence be discovered throughout the course of the litigation which determines that Bankers Trust corporation is a proper party to these suits, plaintiffs listed in schedule A may reinstitute these actions without regard to the applicable statute of limitations, assuming said original actions were timely commenced, and in such instance these defendants shall not assert the statute of limitations as a defense. The stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/19/2013) (js)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the above entitled actions, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled actions be, and the same hereby are discontinued without prejudice, only as against defendant BT Private Clients Corp., now as DB Private Clients Corp., without costs to either party as against the other. It is hereby stipulated and agreed, that should evidence be discovered throughout the course of the litigation which determines that BT Private Clients Corp. is a proper party to these suits, plaintiffs listed in schedule A may reinstitute these actions without regard to the applicable statute of limitations, assuming said original actions were were timely commenced, and in such instance these defendants shall not assert the statute of limitations as a defense. This stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/19/2013) (js)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH TAYLOR RECYCLING AND DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE: The Court has been advised that Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP, and counsel for Taylor Recycling, LLP, have reached a settlement of all claims against Taylor Recycling in the above-captioned cases. The Court has received a pair of stipulations to dismiss settled cases. I rule as follows. The Settlement with Taylor Recycling is Fair and Reasonable, and the Claims of the 1,802 Plaintiffs who Filed Proper Settlement Paperwork is Endorsed. The Complaints of 26 Derivative Plaintiffs who Alleged Claims Against Taylor Recycling, but who did not File Proper Settlement Paperwork, Are Dismissed Involuntarily for Failure to Prosecute. A group of Plaintiffs who had to cure their paperwork held claims against Taylor Recycling. I have been informed that 26 of these Plaintiffs have not cured the defects in their paperwork. Accordingly, I dismiss the complaints of these 26 Plaintiffs for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The dismissals are with prejudice. The list of 26 Plaintiffs is attached to this Order. One final point deserves notice. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel submitted a proposed stipulation dismissing these 26 Plaintiffs, which suggests the dismissals are voluntary, that is, specifically requested by each such Plaintiff. It seems that this is not the case. Liaison Counsel's stipulation and proposed order of dismissal is rejected, and is being returned. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/21/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(jpo)
June 15, 2011 Filing 81 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST TAYLOR RECYCLING, LCC, filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel: The joint motion is granted. The originals of the stip'ns (exs. 3, 4) have been signed and are being docketed. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al. (ab)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT: As described above, I approve the settlement as fair and reasonable, in the context of previous settlements that I approved. I decline to express any opinion on the fairness or appropriateness of the particular terms and conditions of this settlement agreement. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/24/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(jpo)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: (THIS STIPULATED ORDER PERTAINS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DOCKET NUMBERS SET FORTH ON EXHIBIT A) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED Plaintiffs and Settling Defendants have entered into a settlement agreement resolving all claims by Plaintiffs against Settling Defendants in the above-captioned action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims against the Settling Defendants and each of them shall be dismissed, and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/2011) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jmi)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: On June 23, 2010, I entered Case Management Order Nos. 10, 7, and 2 in the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 Consolidated Master Dockets, respectively. On October 27, 2010, I extended the potential expiration date of all three Case Management Orders to December 21, 2010. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference held on December 22, 2010, I hereby extend the December 21, 2010 deadline to February 2, 2011. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/28/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(db)
August 30, 2010 Filing 77 STIPULATION: It is hereby sitpulated and agreed by and between the parties, that with respect to the actions listed "Schedule A" attached hereto, that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp., only as to the claims being made as to the premises identified in the First Amended Master Complaint and individual; Check-off Complaint as 140 West Street, New York, NY 1007, shall be and are hereby discontinued without prejudice and without costs as to any party against the other. It is further stipulated and agreed that upon Amended Master Complaint and Amended Form Check-Off Complaint, Plaintiffs will remove all references to Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp. with regard to 140 West Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/30/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(jpo)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER. It is hereby stipulated and agreed, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the Plaintiffs listed on the attached Schedules A and B, and the attorneys for defendants Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., 222 Broadway, LLC and CAP, Inc. (Collectively "Merrill Lynch"), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B Co. GP Corp., WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co. GP Corp., and WFP Retail Co. L.P. (Collectively "Brookfield") and Battery Park City Authority ("BPCA") in these actions, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, the matters (a) listed on Schedule A be and the same are hereby dismissed with prejudice as against the above-named Merrill Lynch, Brookfield and BPCA Parties only and without costs to any party with respect to all claims that could have been brought in relation to (i) the existing pleadings of the Plaintiffs and (ii) a second injury to the extent permitted by New York State law by reason of the so-called "two-injury rule" and (b) listed on Schedule B be and the same are hereby dismissed with prejudice as against the above-named Merrill Lynch Parties only and without costs to any party with respect to all claims that could have been brought in relation to (i) the existing pleadings of the Plaintiffs and (ii) a second injury to the extent permitted by New York State law by reason of the so-called "two-injury rule." It is further stipulated and agreed, that the attorneys for Merrill Lynch, Brookfield or BPCA will submit a fully executed copy of this stipulation to the Court so that it may be "So Ordered" and filed with the Clerk of the Court. This Order Relates to claims against Merrill Lynch, Brookfield and Battery Park City Authority only in all cases listed on Schedules A and B. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/22/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that the firm of Dickstein Shapiro LLP, 1633 Broadway, New York, New York, 10019 be substituted as counsel of record for defendant Battery Park City Authority in the cases set forth on Schedule A hereto (with respect to the claims therein involving Two World Financial Center (225 Liberty Street) and/or Four World Financial Center (250 Vesey Street)), in place and stead of Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP. Relates to All Cases Listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/3/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm)
March 30, 2010 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard F. Strongin on behalf of Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Strongin, Howard)
March 30, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristy Marie Ferraro on behalf of Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Ferraro, Kristy)
March 30, 2010 Filing 72 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc..(Taylor, Jill)
March 30, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Suzanne Taylor on behalf of Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Taylor, Jill)
March 30, 2010 Filing 70 NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Taylor, Jill)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CONSENT ORDER. IT IS HEREBY CONSENTED AND AGREED, that Bivona & Cohen, P.C., by Richard M. Fedrow, Esq., be substituted as attorney of record for the undersigned parties in the above entitled action in place and stead of Wade Clark Mulcahy by Robert J. Cosgrove, Esq. and Cheryl D. Fuchs, Esq. as of the date hereof. Relates to Member Cases listed and also to 06-11910, 05-10135, 08-2253, 08-1648, 08-2256, 07-5287, 08-2616, 05-9820, 06-3301, 08-2275, 06-11025, 08-2287, 07-4494, 07-066, 05-10738, 08-2297, 07-1688, 08-4941, 05-5601, 08-2308, 08-2309, 08-2313, 06-1652, 06-0997. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/22/09) (rjm)
June 22, 2009 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Fedrow on behalf of New York University (Fedrow, Richard)
May 25, 2009 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to 140 West Street (Verizon Building), Verizon Properties, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, Verizon New York, Inc. (ama)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER That the Defendant's motion to have Thomas R. Harrington, Esquire admitted to practice law in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York pro hac vice in connection with the above-captioned case is GRANTED. Counsel is directed to immediately apply for an ECF password at www.nysd.uscourts.gov and shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL CASES IN THE WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION IN WHICH AIG REALTY, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC. AND AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL REALTY CORP. IS A DEFENDANT. Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103; granting (443) Motion for Thomas R. Harrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00103-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/19/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm)
May 13, 2009 Filing 64 FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP. (Calabrese, Salvatore)
May 4, 2009 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-mc-00103-AKH. (rjm)
May 4, 2009 Filing 63 STIPULATION OF TRANSFER OF CERTAIN ENUMERATED CIVIL ACTIONS. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that the civil actions referenced in Attachment A be and hereby are transferred from 21 MC 102 to 21 MC 103; and it is further STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that for all civil actions transferred pursuant to this Stipulation, Defendants will not raise the Statute of Limitations as a defense if the original action was timely filed and served, but that Defendants shall have all rights and defenses pursuant to New York Unconsolidated Laws Sections 7101 et seq. or any applicable statute of limitation that they have as of the date each action is discontinued pursuant to this Stipulation. Relates to 07-0066, 07-0062, 07-11025, 07-2708, 07-5287, 07-1688, 05-9820, 07-8283, 07-1623, 08-2616, 07-5362, 07-5339. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/1/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
April 6, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore J. Calabrese on behalf of HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP (Calabrese, Salvatore)
March 27, 2009 Filing 61 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: WADE CLARK MULCAHY, New Attorney: BIVONA & COHEN, P.C., Address: BIVONA & COHEN, P.C., 88 Pine Street, New York, New York, 10005, 212-363-3100. Document filed by New York University. (Cosgrove, Robert)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by and between the undersigned, that the firm of Faust Goetz, Two Rector Street, New York, New York 10006 be substituted as counsel of record for defendant Battery Park City Authority in the cases set forth on Schedule A hereto (with Respect to the claims therein involving One World Financial Center (200 Liberty Street) in place and stead of Wilson, Elser, Moskowiu, Edelman & Dicker LLP. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/10/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jmi)
February 26, 2009 Filing 59 STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the defendant's time to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to the Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint by William F. Collins, AIA Architects, LLP, filed and served on October 31, 2008, and originally set for February 24, 2009 shall be and hereby is extended for an additional 7 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Tuesday, March 3, 2009. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/25/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
February 26, 2009 Filing 58 STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the defendant's time to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to the Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint by Syska Hennessy Group, Inc., filed and served on October 31, 2008, and originally set for February 24, 2009 shall be and hereby is extended for an additional 7 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Tuesday, March 3, 2009. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/26/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the actions listed in "Schedule A" and "Schedule B" attached hereto, that whereas no part herein is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, and based on the representation of the within Defendant, and to the extent Plaintiff(s) can so stipulate, that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against Defendant NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF SMALL BUSINESS SERVICES ("DSBS'), only as to the claims being made as to the premises located at 345 Chambers St. (Stuyvesant High School), New York, New York, shall be and are hereby discontinued without prejudice and without costs to any party as against the other. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that should evidence be discovered throughout this litigation which determines that the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF SMALL BUSINESS SERVICES is a proper entity to this suit, that Plaintiff(s) may reinstitute the actions listed herein without regard to the applicable Statute of Limitations, assuming said original action was timely commenced, and in such instance Defendant shall not assert Statute of Limitation as a defense. This Stipulation maybe filed without notice with the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/17/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jmi)
February 3, 2009 Filing 56 STIPULATION OF TRANSFER OF CERTAIN ENUMERATED CIVIL ACTIONS. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that the civil actions referenced in Attachment A be and hereby are transferred from 21 MC 102 to 21 MC 103; and it is further STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that for all civil actions transferred pursuant to this Stipulation, Defendants will not raise the Statute of Limitations as a defense if the original action was timely filed and served, but that Defendants shall have all rights and defenses pursuant to New York Unconsolidated Laws Sections 7101 et seq. or any applicable statute of limitation that they have as of the date each action is discontinued pursuant to this Stipulation. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER DISASTER SITE LITIGATION, 21MC102, 21MC103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/3/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
January 13, 2009 Filing 55 CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP be substituted as counsel for Defendant WILLIAM F. COLLINS, AIA ARCHITECTS. LLP i/s/h/a WILLIAM F. COLLINS ARCHITECTS in the above~captioned action as of this date, in place and instead of Donovan Hatem LLP. Attorney David M. Pollack for William F. Collins, William F. Collins Architects, added. This Document relates to All World Trade Center Disaster Site Litigation. Also Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/13/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
January 7, 2009 Filing 54 STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel that the Defendant's Syska Hennessy Group, Inc., Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint, filed and served on October 31, 2008. is amended to include the new and/or amended complaints listed in the attached service riders, as well as any future new and/or amended complaints served upon Syska Hennessy Group, Inc. This Document Applies to All World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation. Also 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
January 7, 2009 Filing 53 STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel that the Defendant's William F. Collins, AIA Architects LLP, Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint, filed and served on October 31, 2008. is amended to include the new and/or amended complaints listed in the attached service riders, as well as any future new and/or amended complaints served upon William F. Collins, AIA Architects, LLP. This Document Applies to All World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation. Also 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
January 6, 2009 Filing 52 CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP be substituted as counsel for Defendant SYSKA HENNESSY GROUP, Inc. s/h/a SYSKA AND HENNESSY in the above-captioned action as of this date, in place and instead of Donovan Hatem LLP.THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. Also Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. Attorney David M. Pollack for Syska and Hennesy added. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/5/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER Consent to Change Attorney. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP be substituted as counsel for Defendants, ACTA Realty Corp. and 25 Broadway Office Properties, LLC, in the above-captioned action as of this date, in place and instead of Donovan Hatem LLP. Attorney David M. Pollack for 25 Broadway Office Properties LLC, ACTA Realty Corp. added. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. Also Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/5/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DIRECTING PRODUCTION OF VICTIMS COMPENSATION FUND RECORDS... ORDERED that, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 552a(b)(11), the USDOJ shall cooperate and make all reasonable efforts to make available and produce the VCF Claimant List. For every individual who has submitted an application and other material to the VCF seeking compensation for death or personal injury, the VCF Claimant List will set forth the claimant's and/or decedent's full name; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, upon receipt of the VCF Claimant List from USDOJ, the Parties shall, upon request, provide copies of same to any other Co-Liaison Counsel in both 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102 and 21 MC103 matters; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, the VCF Claimant List produced by the USDOJ to the Parties under this Order shall be held in the strictest confidence, used only for purposes of the above-captioned litigations, not divulged to any third party, either in whole or in part, without the express written permission of this Court, and not filed with the Court unless under seal or with the Court's express written permission; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, upon final resolution of all matters contained within the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 litigations, the VCF Claimant List produced by the USDOJ to any party's counsel under this Order, shall be returned to the USDOJ within ninety (90) days or destroyed. This Document applies to All World Trade Center Disaster Site Litigation. Also applies to 21mc 100, 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/30/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DIRECTING PRODUCTION OF VICTIMS COMPENSATION FUND RECORDS... ORDERED that, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 552a(b)(11), the USDOJ shall cooperate and make all reasonable efforts to make available and produce the VCF Claimant List. For every individual who has submitted an application and other material to the VCF seeking compensation for death or personal injury, the VCF Claimant List will set forth the claimant's and/or decedent's full name; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, upon receipt of the VCF Claimant List from USDOJ, the Parties shall, upon request, provide copies of same to any other Co-Liaison Counsel in both 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102 and 21 MC103 matters; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, the VCF Claimant List produced by the USDOJ to the Parties under this Order shall be held in the strictest confidence, used only for purposes of the above-captioned litigations, not divulged to any third party, either in whole or in part, without the express written permission of this Court, and not filed with the Court unless under seal or with the Court's express written permission; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, upon final resolution of all matters contained within the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 litigations, the VCF Claimant List produced by the USDOJ to any party's counsel under this Order, shall be returned to the USDOJ within ninety (90) days or destroyed. This Document applies to All World Trade Center Disaster Site Litigation. Also applies to 21mc 100, 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/30/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT Cozen O'Connor, with offices at 45 Broadway Atrium, 16th Floor, New York, New York 10006, telephone number (212) 509-9400, be substituted as counsel of record for defendant TRC Engineers, Inc. in the above-entitled action in the place and stead of the undersigned attorneys. This document applies to All Cases in the World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation in which TRC Engineers, Inc. is a defendant., Motions terminated: (2930 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP, New Attorney: Cozen O'Connor. filed by TRC Engineers, Inc. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/3/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
November 7, 2008 Filing 47 STIPULATION IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the plaintiffs' time to respond to the Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint by Syska Hennessy Group, Inc. and William F. Collins, AlA Architects, LLP, filed and served on October 31, 2008, originally set for November 14, 2008, shall be and hereby is extended for 60 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Tuesday, January 13,2009 with defendants' Reply papers to be tiled and served on or before Thursday February 12, 2009., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (2997 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)., (2993 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended master Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended master Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). :( Responses due by 1/13/2009, Replies due by 2/12/2009.). Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/7/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
October 28, 2008 Filing 46 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kevin Gerard Horbatiuk on behalf of The Board of Managers of The One Liberty Plaza Condominium BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC. New Address: Russo, Keane & Toner, LLP, 33 Whitehall Street, 16th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10004, 212-482-0001. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Horbatiuk, Kevin)
October 2, 2008 Filing 45 NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Flannery, John)
September 24, 2008 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. 2929 in 1:21-mc-102 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney David Pollack : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jar)
September 24, 2008 Filing 44 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of William F. Collins Architects. Document filed by Syska and Hennessy.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Pollack, David)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the actions listed in Schedule "A" attached hereto, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above-entitled actions be, and the same hereby are discontinued without prejudice as against The Bank of New York Mellon, Corporation, as Successor to the Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of NY, One Wall Street Holdings LLC, 4101 Austin Blvd Corporation and the Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A., and as to the 130 Liberty Street locations only, without costs to either party as against the other. This stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/30/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(djc)
May 28, 2008 Filing 42 NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Tucker Anthony, Inc.. (Caputo, Ida)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 6 Regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this Case Management Order No. 6. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/6/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (DUPLICATE) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5 (AMENDING THE MASTER COMPLAINT AND CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT). Leave is hereby granted for the filing of the First Amended Master Complaint and First Amended Check-Off Complaint in this Litigation... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this Case Management Order No. 5. This Document Applies to All In Re World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/28/08) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Case Management Order # 5, #2 Exhibit B to Case Management Order # 5) Filed in ALL Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(db)
March 17, 2008 Filing 39 STIPULATION. It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between counsel for the parties in cases 07-8722, 07,5701, and 07,8721 that these cases which were filed by plaintiffs in 21mc100 are hereby transferred from 21mc100 to 21mc102 for all purposes. This Document also relates to 07-8722, 07-5701, 07-8721 as well as member cases for 21mc102. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/14/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al. (rjm)
February 15, 2008 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC., Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., WFP Tower A Co. L.P., WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp., BFP Tower C Co. LLC, BFP Tower C MM LLC, WFP Retail Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.. (Smith, William)
February 12, 2008 Filing 37 NOTICE of Notice of Adoption of Answer To The Master Complaint. Document filed by Ann Taylor Stores Corporation. (Joyce, William)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed on Schedule A are discontinued without prejudice against Verizon New York Inc., only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to claims against Verizon New York Inc. only in: All Cases listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/6/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
February 6, 2008 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by FGP 90 West Street Inc.. (Gordon, Keara)
February 4, 2008 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert James Cosgrove on behalf of New York University (Cosgrove, Robert)
February 4, 2008 Filing 33 NOTICE of Adoption of NYU Defendants Master Answer. Document filed by New York University. (Cosgrove, Robert)
February 4, 2008 Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. NO Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York University.(Cosgrove, Robert)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AND COURT ORDER... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed on Schedule A are discontinued without prejudice as against The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, as successor to The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York, One Wall Street Holding LLC, 4101 Austin Blvd. Corporation and The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A., and as to the 130 Liberty Street locations only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of discontinuance. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/28/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
January 28, 2008 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gillian Hines Kost on behalf of The Related Companies, LP, Related Management Company, LP, The Related Realty Group, Inc., Related BPC Associates, Inc., Liberty View Associates, LP. (Kost, Gillian)
January 25, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The American Stock Exchange, L.L.C., American Stock Exchange Clearing, LLC, American Stock Exchange Realty Associates, LLC, New York City Industrial Development Agency. (Leff, Richard)
January 25, 2008 Filing 28 NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by RY Management Co., Inc.. (Leff, Richard)
January 23, 2008 Filing 27 NOTICE of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by The Related Companies, LP, Related Management Company, LP, The Related Realty Group, Inc., Related BPC Associates, Inc., Liberty View Associates, LP.. (Kost, Gillian)
January 18, 2008 Filing 26 NOTICE of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.. (Cohen, Judith)
January 18, 2008 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Rita Cohen on behalf of Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (Cohen, Judith)
January 17, 2008 Filing 24 NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by American Express Bank Ltd, American Express Company, American Express Travel Realted Services Company, Inc.. (Leff, Richard)
January 15, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Lehman Brothers Inc., Lehman Commercial Paper Inc., Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Leff, Richard)
January 15, 2008 Filing 22 NOTICE of ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Company. (Haglund, Benjamin)
January 15, 2008 Filing 21 NOTICE of ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Bankers Trust Corporation. (Haglund, Benjamin)
January 15, 2008 Filing 20 NOTICE of ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by DB Private Clients Corporation, BT Private Clients Corp.. (Haglund, Benjamin)
January 15, 2008 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Trammel Crow Company.(Lichtenstein, Jon)
January 11, 2008 Filing 18 NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Inc.. (Leff, Richard)
January 10, 2008 Filing 17 NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by General Reinsurance Corporation. (Leff, Richard)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE that each claim, cross-claim, and counter-claim asserted by and against -Brookfield Properties Holdings Inc.- only, shall be discontinued without prejudice... and without costs to any party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of discontinuance. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/3/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
January 7, 2008 Filing 15 NOTICE of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Structure Tone Global Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Joyce, William)
January 7, 2008 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Board of Managers of Hudson View East Condominium, Hudson View East Condominium.(Nagler, Vincent)
January 2, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Andrew Harrington on behalf of Weston Solutions Inc. (Harrington, Jason)
January 2, 2008 Filing 12 NOTICE of ADOPTION. Document filed by Weston Solutions Inc.. (Harrington, Jason)
December 20, 2007 Filing 11 NOTICE of Notice of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Castastophe, Inc.. (Keenan, Frank)
December 2, 2007 Filing 10 NOTICE of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Verizon New York, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:07-cv-00066-AKH(Reisman, Michael)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above action is discontinued against - Verizon Properties Inc. only- without prejudice... and without costs to any party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order of dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above action is discontinued against -Verizon Communications Inc. only- without prejudice... and without costs to any party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order of dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
September 20, 2007 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to 140 West Street (Verizon Building), Tribeca Landing L.L.C., Board of Education of The City of New York (Owner), New York City School Construction Authority (Owner), The City of New York (Owner), Battery Park City Authority (owner), Rockrose Development Corp. (Owner), New Libert y Plaza LP (Owner), World Financial Properties, L.P. (Owner), WFP One Liberty Plaza CO., L.P. (Owner), One Liberty Plaza (Owner), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc. (owner), The One Liberty Plaza Condominium (Condo #178) (Owner), The Board Of Managers Of The One Liberty Plaza Condominium (Condo #1178) (Owner), BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., LLC (Owner), National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc. (Owner), New York City Industrial Development Agency (Owner), New York City Industrial Development Corporation (Owner), Hillman Environmental Group, LLC. (agent/contractor), General Re Services Corp (Owner/Agent), 130 Liberty Street (Deutsche Bank Building)., Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (Owner), Deutsche Bank Trust Company (Owner), Bankers Trust Corporation (Owner), Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Owner), The Bank of New York Trust Company NA (Owner), Tishman Interiors Corporation (contractor), Tully Construction Co., Inc. (Contractor), 225 Rector Place (Parc Place), Liberty View Associates, L.P. (Owner), Related Management Co., LP (Owner), Related Management Group, Inc. (Owner), Related BPC Associates, Inc. (owner), Hudson View Towers Associates (Owner), Hudson View East Condominum (Owner), Board of Managers of the Hudson View East Condominium (Owner), RY Management Co., Inc. (Owner), Thames Realty Co. (owner), New York University (owner), 63 Wall Street, 63 Wall Street Inc. (Owner), Brown Brothers Harriman & co., Inc. (Agent), 90 West Street (West Street Building), FGP 90 West Street, Inc. (Owner), Kibel Companies (Owner), The City University Of New York Owner, 200 Liberty Street (One World Financial Center), Brookfield Properties Corporation (Owner), Brookfield Financial Properties L.P. (Owner), Brookfield Financial Properties Inc. (Owner), Brookfield Properties Holdings Inc. (Owner), Brookfield Partners LP (Owner), WFP Tower A. Co. (Owner), WFP Tower A. Co. L.P. (Owner), WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner), Tucker Anthony, Inc. (Agent), 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center), Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (Owner), Weston Solutions, Inc. (agent/contractor), GPS Environmental Consultants, Inc. (agent/contractor), Indoor Environmental Technology, Inc. (agent/contractor), Structure Tone (UK), Inc. (contractor), Structure Tone Global Services, Inc. (contractor), Envirotech Clean Air, Inc. (Contractor), Alan Kasman DBA Kasco (contractor), Kasco Restoraton Services, Co. (Contractor), Nomura Holding America Inc. (Owner), HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, Nomura Securities International Inc. (Owner), WFP Tower B Holding Co. LP (Owner), WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp. (owner), WFP Tower B Co. L.P. (Owner), Toscorp. Inc. (Owner), Ann Taylor Stores Corporation (Owner), 200 Vesey Street (Three World Financial Center), BFP Tower C Co. LLC (Owner), BFP Tower C. MM LLC. (Owner), WFP Retail Co. L.P. (owner), WFP Retail Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner), American Express Company (Owner), American Express Bank, LTD (Owner), American Express Travel Related Service Company, Inc. (Owner), Lehman Brothers, Inc. (Owner), Lehman Commercial Papers, Inc. (Owner), Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (Owner), Trammell Crow Company (Agent), McClier Corporation (agent), Trammell Crow Corporation Services, Inc. (Agent), 250 Vesley Street (Four World Financial Center), WFP Tower D. Co. L.P. (Owner), WFP Tower D Co., G.P. Corp. (owner), WFP Tower D Holding 1 G.P. Corp. (Owner), WFP Tower D. Holding Co. 1 L.P. (Owner), WFP Tower D Holding Co. 11 L.P. (Owner), 40 Rector Street, New York Telephone Company (Agent), PS. 234 Independence School, Sabine Zerarka (owner). (pl)
September 20, 2007 Filing 69 AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT Related to the Master Complaint 68 Amended Complaint, against 140 West Street (Verizon Building), Verizon Properties, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., 345 Chambers Street (Stuyvesant Hight School), Tribeca Landing L.L.C., Board of Education of The City of New York (Owner), New York City School Construction Authority (Owner), The City of New York (Owner), Battery Park City Authority (owner), Department of Business Services (Agent), Rockrose Development Corp. (Owner), New Libert y Plaza LP (Owner), World Financial Properties, L.P. (Owner), WFP One Liberty Plaza CO., L.P. (Owner), One Liberty Plaza (Owner), Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc. (owner), The One Liberty Plaza Condominium (Condo #178) (Owner), The Board Of Managers Of The One Liberty Plaza Condominium (Condo #1178) (Owner), BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., LLC (Owner), National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc. (Owner), New York City Industrial Development Agency (Owner), New York City Industrial Development Corporation (Owner), Hillman Environmental Group, LLC. (agent/contractor), General Re Services Corp (Owner/Agent), 130 Liberty Street (Deutsche Bank Building)., Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (Owner), Deutsche Bank Trust Company (Owner), Bankers Trust Corporation (Owner), Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Owner), The Bank of New York Trust Company NA (Owner), BT Private Clients Corp. (Owner), Tishman Interiors Corporation (contractor), Tully Construction Co., Inc. (Contractor), 225 Rector Place (Parc Place), Liberty View Associates, L.P. (Owner), Related Management Co., LP (Owner), Related Management Group, Inc. (Owner), Related BPC Associates, Inc. (owner), 250 South End Avenue (Hudson View East), Hudson View Towers Associates (Owner), Hudson View East Condominum (Owner), Board of Managers of the Hudson View East Condominium (Owner), RY Management Co., Inc. (Owner), 100 Trinity Place (Hig School Of Ecomomics and Finance), Thames Realty Co. (owner), New York University (owner), 63 Wall Street, 37 Wall, Inc (Owner), 63 Wall Street Inc. (Owner), Brown Brothers Harriman & co., Inc. (Agent), 90 West Street (West Street Building), FGP 90 West Street, Inc. (Owner), Kibel Companies (Owner), 30 West Braodway, The City University Of New York Owner, 200 Liberty Street (One World Financial Center), Brookfield Properties Corporation (Owner), Brookfield Financial Properties L.P. (Owner), Brookfield Financial Properties Inc. (Owner), Brookfield Properties Holdings Inc. (Owner), Brookfield Partners LP (Owner), WFP Tower A. Co. (Owner), WFP Tower A. Co. L.P. (Owner), WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner), Tucker Anthony, Inc. (Agent), 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center), Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (Owner), Weston Solutions, Inc. (agent/contractor), GPS Environmental Consultants, Inc. (agent/contractor), Indoor Environmental Technology, Inc. (agent/contractor), Structure Tone (UK), Inc. (contractor), Structure Tone Global Services, Inc. (contractor), Envirotech Clean Air, Inc. (Contractor), Alan Kasman DBA Kasco (contractor), Kasco Restoraton Services, Co. (Contractor), Nomura Holding America Inc. (Owner), HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, Nomura Securities International Inc. (Owner), WFP Tower B Holding Co. LP (Owner), WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp. (owner), WFP Tower B Co. L.P. (Owner), Toscorp. Inc. (Owner), Ann Taylor Stores Corporation (Owner), 200 Vesey Street (Three World Financial Center), BFP Tower C Co. LLC (Owner), BFP Tower C. MM LLC. (Owner), WFP Retail Co. L.P. (owner), WFP Retail Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner), American Express Company (Owner), American Express Bank, LTD (Owner), American Express Travel Related Service Company, Inc. (Owner), Lehman Brothers, Inc. (Owner), Lehman Commercial Papers, Inc. (Owner), Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (Owner), Trammell Crow Company (Agent), McClier Corporation (agent), Trammell Crow Corporation Services, Inc. (Agent), 250 Vesley Street (Four World Financial Center), WFP Tower D. Co. L.P. (Owner), WFP Tower D Co., G.P. Corp. (owner), WFP Tower D Holding 1 G.P. Corp. (Owner), WFP Tower D. Holding Co. 1 L.P. (Owner), WFP Tower D Holding Co. 11 L.P. (Owner), 40 Rector Street, New York Telephone Company (Agent), PS. 234 Independence School, Sabine Zerarka (owner), Verizon New York, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Angel Naranjo, Blanca Naranjo. Related document: 68 Amended Complaint, filed by Angel Naranjo, Blanca Naranjo.(pl)
September 20, 2007 *** Party Nomura Holding America Inc. (Owner), and Nomura Securities International Inc. (Owner), and WFP Tower B Holding Co. LP (Owner), and WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp. (owner), and WFP Tower B Co. L.P. (Owner), and Toscorp. Inc. (Owner), and Ann Taylor Stores Corporation (Owner), and 200 Vesey Street (Three World Financial Center), and BFP Tower C Co. LLC (Owner), and BFP Tower C. MM LLC. (Owner), and WFP Retail Co. L.P. (owner), and WFP Retail Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner), and American Express Company (Owner), and American Express Bank, LTD (Owner), and American Express Travel Related Service Company, Inc. (Owner), and Lehman Brothers, Inc. (Owner), and Lehman Commercial Papers, Inc. (Owner), and Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (Owner), and Trammell Crow Company (Agent), and McClier Corporation (agent), and Trammell Crow Corporation Services, Inc. (Agent), and 250 Vesley Street (Four World Financial Center), and WFP Tower D. Co. L.P. (Owner), and WFP Tower D Co., G.P. Corp. (owner), and WFP Tower D Holding 1 G.P. Corp. (Owner), and WFP Tower D. Holding Co. 1 L.P. (Owner), and WFP Tower D Holding Co. 11 L.P. (Owner), and 40 Rector Street, and New York Telephone Company (Agent), and New York Telephone Company (Agent), and PS. 234 Independence School, and Sabine Zerarka (owner) added. (pl)
September 17, 2007 Filing 7 NOTICE of ADOPTION (ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT). Document filed by HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP. (Rosmarin, Sam)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER in case 1:04-cv-09003-AKH; granting (490) Motion for Anita B. Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney W. Steve Berman for Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm)
August 7, 2007 Filing 4 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE as to Defendant, New York City Economic Development Corporation Only: each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against defendant New York City Economic Development Corporation, only as to the claims being made as to the premises located at One Liberty Plaza, New York, New York and 76/78 Trinity Place, New York, New York are discontinued without prejudice and without costs to any party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/7/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(kkc)
August 3, 2007 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (122 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION to Stay all claims against Verizon New York Inc. in 21 MC 103 and to confirm the stay against Verizon New York Inc. in 21 MC 103. (Filing Fee $ 39.00.) MOTION to Stay all claims against Verizon New York Inc. in 21 MC 103 and to confirm the stay against Verizon New York Inc. in 21 MC 103. (Filing Fee $ 39.00.). Document filed by Verizon New York Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Grochow, Robert)
June 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 4 (this document applies to all cases): Plaintiffs Master Complaint is filed as part of this Order under docket number 21-MC-102. The Master Complaint contains allegations that may be suitable for incorporation by reference in individual cases. The Master Complaint shall apply to all cases filed before or after the entry of this Order. Plaintiffs format for the Check-Off Complaint is filed as part of this Order under docket number 21-MC-102... The Check-Off Complaint contains allegations that may be suitable for individual cases. The Check-Off Complaint shall be used in all cases filed before or after entry of this Order and shall be utilized as the format for all actions to be filed by all Plaintiffs... Consolidation is hereby ordered as to Check-Off Complaints filed pursuant to the Courts June 4, 2007 Order and March 21, 2007 Case Management Order No. 3, and the Clerk of the Court is so advised. Leave is hereby granting for filing a Check-Off Complaint under the earliest civil action number, as indicated above... Every Plaintiff commencing an action after the entry of this Order shall do so by the filing of a Summons and Check-Off Complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or as otherwise required by the terms of this Order or subsequent Case Management Orders entered in 21-MC-102... Except as the Court may otherwise establish by separate motion schedule, each Defendant or group of Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Master Complaint by August 3, 2007. Defendants are granted leave to file motions, through liaison counsel, pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure... Plaintiffs and Defendants Liaison Counsel are hereby directed to provide a copy of this Order to all counsel who have appeared in these actions for Plaintiffs and Defendants, respectively... Discovery is not stayed, and may commence at any time consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court declines to appoint a Special Master at this time. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/29/2007) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A#2 Appendix B#3 Appendix C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(kkc)
May 25, 2007 Filing 68 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against 140 West Street (Verizon Building), Verizon Properties, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, Verizon New York, Inc..Document filed by Angel Naranjo, Blanca Naranjo. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Angel Naranjo, Blanca Naranjo.(ama)
January 3, 2007 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Case consolidated with 21mc102. (jeh)
January 3, 2007 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED TO 21mc102. (jeh)
January 3, 2007 Magistrate Judge Theordore Katz is so designated. (jeh)
January 3, 2007 Case Designated ECF. (jeh)
January 3, 2007 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Verizon New York, Inc. (jeh)
January 3, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Verizon New York, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 601545)Document filed by Angel Naranjo, Blanca Naranjo.(jeh) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2007 (gf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naranjo et al v. Verizon New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Libert y Plaza LP (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Taylor Stores Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 140 West Street (Verizon Building)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Brothers Harriman & co., Inc. (Agent)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasco Restoraton Services, Co. (Contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower A. Co. L.P. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Service Company, Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Related BPC Associates, Inc. (owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Commercial Papers, Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kibel Companies (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Private Clients Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tully Construction Co., Inc. (Contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower D. Co. L.P. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Trust Company NA (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 200 Vesey Street (Three World Financial Center)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 200 Liberty Street (One World Financial Center)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Castastophe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Financial Properties, L.P. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York University (owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Related Management Group, Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Battery Park City Authority (owner)
Represented By: Judith Rita Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Represented By: Howard F. Strongin
Represented By: Kristy Marie Ferraro
Represented By: Jill Suzanne Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structure Tone (UK), Inc. (contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabine Zerarka (owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tam 140 West Street (Verizon Building)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of The City of New York (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Taylor Stores Corporation (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Industrial Development Corporation (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower A Co. L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPS Environmental Consultants, Inc. (agent/contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trammell Crow Company (Agent)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower D Co. L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Telephone Company (Agent)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Stock Exchange Realty Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Holding America, Inc.
Represented By: Howard F. Strongin
Represented By: Kristy Marie Ferraro
Represented By: Jill Suzanne Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BT Private Clients Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank, LTD (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Retail Co. G.P. Corp. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Stock Exchange Clearing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClier Corporation (agent)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Holding America Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillman Environmental Group, LLC. (agent/contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Related Management Co., LP (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP
Represented By: Salvatore J. Calabrese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower D Holding 1 G.P. Corp. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thames Realty Co. (owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Related BPC Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Gillian Hines Kost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFP Tower C. MM LLC. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 100 Trinity Place (Hig School Of Ecomomics and Finance)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson View East Condominum (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FGP 90 West Street, Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 250 Vesley Street (Four World Financial Center)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Reinsurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Financial Properties L.P. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Properties Corporation (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Liberty Plaza (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Realted Services Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Related Companies, LP
Represented By: Gillian Hines Kost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Managers of the Hudson View East Condominium (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Industrial Development Agency (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 37 Wall, Inc (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower D Co., G.P. Corp. (owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Retail Co. L.P. (owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Industrial Development Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Judith Rita Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trammell Crow Corporation Services, Inc. (Agent)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Trust Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 345 Chambers Street (Stuyvesant Hight School)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 90 West Street (West Street Building)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Trust Corporation (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP One Liberty Plaza CO., L.P. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 40 Rector Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 225 Liberty Street (Two World Financial Center)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc. (owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structure Tone Global Services, Inc. (contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 63 Wall Street Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Related Management Company, LP
Represented By: Gillian Hines Kost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower A. Co. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Stock Exchange, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envirotech Clean Air, Inc. (Contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Retail Co. L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The One Liberty Plaza Condominium (Condo #178) (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower D Holding Co. 11 L.P. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Commercial Paper Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 250 South End Avenue (Hudson View East)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Related Realty Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gillian Hines Kost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers, Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Properties Holdings Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toscorp. Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weston Solutions, Inc. (agent/contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty View Associates, L.P. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower D. Holding Co. 1 L.P. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFP Tower C Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFP Tower C MM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribeca Landing L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RY Management Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BT Private Clients Corp. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 130 Liberty Street (Deutsche Bank Building).
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Financial Properties Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Battery Park City Authority
Represented By: William J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trammel Crow Company
Represented By: Jon David Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower B Holding Co. LP (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockrose Development Corp. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson View Towers Associates (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Kasman DBA Kasco (contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower B Co. L.P. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RY Management Co., Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucker Anthony, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower B Co. L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FGP 90 West Street Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 30 West Braodway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weston Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Jason Andrew Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 63 Wall Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., LLC (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 225 Rector Place (Parc Place)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City School Construction Authority (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower D Co. G.P. Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City University Of New York Owner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFP Tower C Co. LLC (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board Of Managers Of The One Liberty Plaza Condominium (Condo #1178) (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York University
Represented By: Richard M. Fedrow
Represented By: Robert James Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Partners LP (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Re Services Corp (Owner/Agent)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation (Owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indoor Environmental Technology, Inc. (agent/contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucker Anthony, Inc. (Agent)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PS. 234 Independence School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty View Associates, LP.
Represented By: Gillian Hines Kost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Business Services (Agent)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structure Tone Global Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishman Interiors Corporation (contractor)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp. (owner)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Naranjo
Represented By: William Joseph Dubanevich
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Naranjo
Represented By: William Joseph Dubanevich
Represented By: Christopher R. LoPalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew William Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Board of Managers of Hudson View East Condominium
Represented By: Richard Eric Leff
Represented By: Vincent A. Nagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Hudson View East Condominium
Represented By: Richard Eric Leff
Represented By: Vincent A. Nagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?