Frantz v. The National Football League Featured Case
Plaintiff: Earnie Frantz
Defendant: The National Football League
Case Number: 1:2007cv00971
Filed: February 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2007 Filing 5
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Earnie Frantz hereby voluntarily dismisses, the above captioned action. Said dismissal is with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/30/07) (js)
April 25, 2007 Filing 4
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against The National Football League.Document filed by Earnie Frantz. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Earnie Frantz.(jco)
March 15, 2007 Filing 3
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The National Football League served on 3/13/2007, answer due 4/2/2007. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Earnie Frantz. (Korenbaum, Scott)
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2
ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:... If such a consent order is not filed within the time provided,... Initial Conference set for 5/18/2007 10:15 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. In Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/6/07) (js)
February 9, 2007 Filing 1
COMPLAINT against The National Football League. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 605484)Document filed by Earnie Frantz.(tro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frantz v. The National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnie Frantz
Represented By: Scott A. Korenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?