Hyde v. Ramsay et al Featured Case

Plaintiff was responsible for booking cabaret-theatre shows at Dillons, an Indian-American restaurant in New York. He alleges that he was constructively fired from his position because celebrity chef Gordon Ramsay falsely blamed him for problems at the restaurant and created intolerable conditions for him to continue his employment. These event occurred during the filming of Ramsay\'s Kitchen Nightmare, a new reality TV show that purports to show Ramsay making over a failing restaurant.

Plaintiff: Martin R. Hyde
Defendant: Gordon Ramsay, Upper Ground Enterprises, Inc., Granada American, Granada Entertainment, A. Smith & Co. and Seven Network Limited
Case Number: 1:2007cv05796
Filed: June 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Shira A. Scheindlin
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2007 Filing 10
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; pursuant to Rule 41 of the F.R.C.P., this action is dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/7/07) (kco)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9
STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Granada dfts time to answer or otherwise move or respond to the complaint is extended to and including 9/4/07. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/30/07) (dle)
July 26, 2007 Filing 8
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Granada Entertainment served on 6/22/2007, answer due 8/15/2007. Service was accepted by "Ms. Smith", Gen'l Agent. Document filed by Martin R. Hyde. (Person, Carl)
July 25, 2007 Filing 4
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Linda Jane Steinman on behalf of Gordon Ramsay, Upper Ground Enterprises, Inc., Granada American, Granada Entertainment, A. Smith & Co. (Steinman, Linda)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3
ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/31/2007 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/10/2007) (jar)
June 19, 2007 Filing 1
COMPLAINT against Seven Network Limited, Gordon Ramsay, Upper Ground Enterprises, Inc., Granada American, Granada Entertainment, A. Smith & Co.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 618758)Document filed by Martin R. Hyde.(tro) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2007 (Becerra, Maribel).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyde v. Ramsay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin R. Hyde
Represented By: Carl E. Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Ramsay
Represented By: Linda Jane Steinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upper Ground Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Linda Jane Steinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granada American
Represented By: Linda Jane Steinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granada Entertainment
Represented By: Linda Jane Steinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Smith & Co.
Represented By: Linda Jane Steinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven Network Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?