Charney et al v. Zimbalist et al
Plaintiff: Scott Charney, Diva Goodfriend-Koven, Robert Reach, Ellen Reach, Toni Allen, Scott Edvabsky, Anthony Corsaro, Barbara Corsaro, Gary Zuccaro, Bruce Lichtenstein, Robert Anarumo, Karen Fusco, Bonnie Vartabedian, Wayne Vartabedian, George Yu, Connie Simons, Laura Flax, Jay Coon, Neil Blitz, Marni Blitz, Joseph Levine, Nina Chaifetz, Ed Haran, Anne Haran, Kathy Paschuk, Bruce Fuller, Tracey Peck, Jeff Peck, Elizabeth Tymczyszynt and GATA Realty, L.L.C.
Defendant: Carla Zimbalist, Pam Chanla, Jennifer S. Wilkov, Evolutionary Strategic Planning, Inc. and Ameriprise Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv06272
Filed: July 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K. Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 361 Report and Recommendation: I adopt Judge Gorenstein's report and recommendation. (Dkt. No. 361). The Clerk shall enter judgment for the plaintiffs in the amount of $1,382,083.01 and mark the case closed. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/19/2016) (tn)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER REVIEWING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT for 280 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Jennifer S. Wilkov, 248 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Marni Blitz, Toni Allen, Ed Haran, Kar en Fusco, Nina Chaifetz, Laura Flax, Bruce Lichtenstein, Anthony Corsaro, CWZ Holding, LLC, Connie Simons, Pam Chanla, Joseph Levine, Robert Anarumo, Wayne Vartabedian, GATA Realty, L.L.C., Barbara Corsaro, Jeff Peck, Scott Charney, Gary Zuccaro, Tracey Peck, Kathy Paschuk, Scott Edvabsky, Bruce Fuller, Diva Goodfriend-Koven, Anne Haran, Neil Blitz, Jay Coon, Bonnie Vartabedian, Elizabeth Tymczyszynt, 267 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Marni Blitz, Toni A llen, Ed Haran, Karen Fusco, Nina Chaifetz, Laura Flax, Bruce Lichtenstein, Anthony Corsaro, Connie Simons, Joseph Levine, Robert Anarumo, Wayne Vartabedian, GATA Realty, L.L.C., Barbara Corsaro, Scott Charney, Gary Zuccaro, Kathy Pas chuk, Scott Edvabsky, Bruce Fuller, Diva Goodfriend-Koven, Anne Haran, Neil Blitz, Jay Coon, Bonnie Vartabedian, Elizabeth Tymczyszynt, 318 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs and Defendant have raised timely objections. 28 U.S.C. § ; 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b). Upon full de nova review, I approve Judge Gorenstein's Report and Recommendation, with one exception: I hold that each of the twenty three plaintiffs proved that they relied on Defendant's representations , and thus there are no triable issues of material fact. Summary judgment is granted to Plaintiffs and against Defendant Jennifer Wilkov on all issues except damages. The case is remanded to Judge Gorenstein to find damages for each Plaintiff, with costs to be assigned after judgments are entered. The Clerk of the Court shall mark the motions (Dkt. No. 248, 267 & 280) as terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/30/2015) (kko)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: 245 MOTION to Amend/Correct 42 Answer to Complaint. filed by Jennifer S. Wilkov. Accordingly, defendant's motion to amend (Docket # 245) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs shall file their proposed Second Amended Complaint by March 19, 2014. Defendant should file her answer within 20 days thereafter. Defendant's answer shall be consistent with this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/12/2014) (ama)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND AND REGULATING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS: Accordingly, Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental submission, by September 11, 2009, explaining which admissions in the plea correspond to which elements of the activities alleged in the Amended Complaint and as to which Plaintiffs. Wilkov shall submit any response by September 18,2009. The parties will appear for oral argument on the Summary Judgment Motion on September 23,2009 at 3:30 p.m. In opposing the Summary Judgment Moti on, Wilkov erroneously argues that the investment products at issue do not constitute "securities" because they are mere land interests. However, Wilkov's Response to Rule 56.1 Statement describes the investment product as a "cert ificate" granting the investor the right to receive "their original investment, plus a portion of the profits in accordance with their percentage contribution to each property purchase." paragraph 2-3. These investments are securities because Zimbalist and Chanla were to "manage, control, and operate the enterprise," while "[t]he investors [were to] provide the capital and share in the... profits," not live in the homes. SEC v. W.J. Howey Co., 328 U.S. 293, 30 0 (1946); United Hous. Found. Inc. v. Forman, 421 U.S. 837, 852-53 (1975) (confining real estate securities to those purchased by investors motivated by profits, meaning "financial returns on their investments," rather than by the prospect of acquiring "a place to live"). Wilkov asserts that, despite admissions in her plea, questions of fact remain as to the RICO allegations. As stated above, Plaintiffs must demonstrate in their supplemental submission that all elements of the relevant claims alleged in the Complaint have been satisfied by the criminal plea. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/27/2009) (jpo)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS AND LEAVE TO FILE HARD COPIES OF EXHIBITS: For the reasons stated herein the motion and the request for leave are both denied. Wilkov's Answer is stricken. She has ten days to file a proper Answer. If she fails timely to do so, plaintiffs may move to strike her answer and for judgment, followed by a renewed motion for sanctions. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 90) as terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/14/2009) (jpo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charney et al v. Zimbalist et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Charney
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diva Goodfriend-Koven
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reach
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Reach
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Allen
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Edvabsky
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Corsaro
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Corsaro
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Zuccaro
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lichtenstein
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Anarumo
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Fusco
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Vartabedian
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Vartabedian
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Yu
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Simons
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Flax
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Coon
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Blitz
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marni Blitz
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Levine
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Chaifetz
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Haran
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Haran
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Paschuk
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Fuller
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Peck
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Peck
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Tymczyszynt
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GATA Realty, L.L.C.
Represented By: Scott A. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Zimbalist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Chanla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer S. Wilkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evolutionary Strategic Planning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?