Burck v. Mars, Incorporated et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Robert Burck d/b/a The Naked Cowboy alleges that Defendants Mars, Inc. and Chute Gerdeman, Inc. infringed his trademark in his get-up, featuring a white cowboy hat, white boots, white underpants and an acoustic guitar.

Plaintiff: Robert Burck
Defendant: Mars, Incorporated and Chute Gerdeman, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv01330
Filed: February 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Denny Chin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2008 Filing 28
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) all parties and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Robert Burck.(Rothman, Scott)
September 11, 2008 Filing 27
FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 26 Motion for Ethan N. Halberstadt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/10/08) (mme)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25
PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 8/29/08) (cd)
August 26, 2008 Filing 26
MOTION for Ethan N. Halberstadt to Appear Pro Hac Vice; w/ attch. affidavit in support. Document filed by Robert Burck.(pl)
July 10, 2008 Filing 24
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Chute Gerdeman, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Joseph)
June 23, 2008 Filing 21
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Brian Shafley. Document filed by Robert Burck. (Mulhearn, Kevin)
June 18, 2008 Filing 18
RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Robert Burck, Mars, Incorporated, Chute Gerdeman, Inc..(Price, Joseph)
May 16, 2008 Filing 17
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Robert Burck. (Rothman, Scott)
April 28, 2008 Filing 15
BRIEF re: 13 MOTION to Strike Document No. 7 Mars, Incorporated's Fair Use and Parody Affirmative Defenses.. Document filed by Robert Burck.(Rothman, Scott)
April 25, 2008 Filing 12
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Mars, Incorporated, Chute Gerdeman, Inc.. (Price, Joseph)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Joseph R. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 4/3/08) (js)
March 19, 2008 Filing 8
MOTION for Joseph R. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Mars, Incorporated.(dle)
March 12, 2008 Filing 4
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Mars, Incorporated served on 2/15/2008, answer due 3/6/2008. Service was accepted by Leslie K. Mitchell, Attorney for Mars, Inc.. Document filed by Robert Burck. (Rothman, Scott)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3
ORDER ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: It is hereby ordered that Scott M. Rothman is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 3/7/2008) (jpo)
February 22, 2008 Filing 2
MOTION for Scott M. Rothman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Robert Burck.(cd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burck v. Mars, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Burck
Represented By: Scott M. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chute Gerdeman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?