Gary Friedrich Enterprises, LLC. et al v. Marvel Enterprises, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Gary Friedrich Enterprises, LLC. and Gary Friedrich
Defendant: Marvel Enterprises, Inc., Marvel Entertainment, Inc., Marvel Studios, Inc., Marvel Characters, Inc., Hasbro, Inc., Take Two Interactive Software, Inc., Columbia Tri-Star Motion Picture Group, Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Crystal Sky Pictures, Relativity Media L.L.C., Michael De Luca Productions, Inc. and Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv01533
Filed: February 14, 2008
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Barbara S. Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2011 334 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: 307 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gary Friedrich Enterprises, LLC., 304 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marvel Worldwide, Inc., Relativity Media L.L.C., Marvel Entertainment, LLC, Take Two Interactive So ftware, Inc., Marvel Characters B.V., Marvel International Character Holdings, Inc., Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Hasbro, Inc., Marvel Characters, Inc., Michael De Luca Productions, Inc., Crystal Sky Pictures, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. , MVL International C.V., Marvel Studios, Inc. Defendants October 17, 2011 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiffs October 17, 2011 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The conduct of further proceedings in this action shall be governe d by an order issued separately with this Memorandum Opinion. The claim of ownership over the Character and the Work (Count I) is resolved in Defendants favor, which necessarily disposes of Plaintiffs claims for infringement relating to (i) the use o f the Character in movies by Marvel and the Movie Defendants (Count II); and (ii) the use of the Character with respect to toys and video games (Count III). Accordingly, Plaintiffs remaining claims in the First Amended Complaint, filed March 28, 2011 (Dkt. No. 95-2)--Counts I, II and III--are dismissed. The conduct of further proceedings in this action shall be governed by an order issued separately with this Memorandum Opinion. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. No. 304 and 307). (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/28/2011) (mro)
July 26, 2011 204 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & ORDER, the Court adopts the R&R of Magistrate Judge Francis in its entirety and DENIES 51 Motion to Dismiss filed by Gary Friedrich, Gary Friedrich Enterprises, LLC. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion docket 51. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 7/26/11) (cd)
May 20, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth in this memorandum and order, the plaintiffs' motion for an order reconvening the deposition of Roy Thomas at the defendant's expense is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/20/11) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm)
September 1, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for Bond. None of the relevant factors strongly favors the posting of a bond, and some weigh against it. The defendants' motion to require the plaintiffs to post bond is therefore denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 9/1/2010) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jmi)
May 3, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For all the foregoing reasons, the Court adopts the R&R of Magistrate Judge Francis in its entirety and GRANTS Defendants' partial Motion to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 4/30/2010) (jfe)
February 14, 2008 1
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - Southern District of Illinois; Case Number: 3:07cv230 (WDS). Original file with documents numbered 79, certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.Document filed by Gary Friedrich Enterprises, LLC., Gary Friedrich.(jeh) (jeh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2008: # 1 1, # 2 1-2, # 3 2, # 4 3, # 5 3-2, # 6 3-3, # 7 3-4, # 8 3-5, # 9 3-6, # 10 3-7, # 11 3-8, # 12 3-9, # 13 3-10, # 14 3-11, # 15 3-12, # 16 3-13, # 17 3-14, # 18 3-15, # 19 3-16, # 20 3-17, # 21 3-18, # 22 3-19, # 23 3-20, # 24 3-21, # 25 3-22, # 26 3-23, # 27 4, # 28 5, # 29 6, # 30 7, # 31 8, # 32 9, # 33 10, # 34 11, # 35 12, # 36 13, # 37 14) (jeh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2008: # 38 15, # 39 16, # 40 17, # 41 18, # 42 19, # 43 20, # 44 21, # 45 21) (jeh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2008: # 46 22, # 47 22, # 48 23, # 49 23, # 50 24, # 51 24, # 52 25, # 53 25, # 54 26, # 55 26, # 56 27, # 57 27, # 58 28, # 59 28, # 60 29, # 61 30, # 62 30, # 63 30, # 64 31, # 65 32, # 66 32, # 67 32, # 68 32, # 69 32, # 70 32, # 71 32, # 72 32, # 73 32, # 74 33, # 75 34, # 76 35, # 77 36, # 78 37, # 79 38, # 80 39, # 81 40, # 82 41, # 83 42, # 84 43, # 85 44, # 86 45, # 87 46, # 88 47, # 89 48, # 90 49, # 91 50) (jeh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2008: # 92 51, # 93 52, # 94 53, # 95 54, # 96 56, # 97 57, # 98 57-2, # 99 57-3, # 100 57-4, # 101 57-5, # 102 58, # 103 59, # 104 60) (jeh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2008: # 105 61, # 106 62, # 107 62-2, # 108 62-3, # 109 62-4, # 110 62-5, # 111 62-6, # 112 62-7, # 113 63, # 114 64, # 115 65, # 116 66, # 117 67, # 118 68, # 119 69, # 120 70-1, # 121 70-2, # 122 71, # 123 72, # 124 73, # 125 74, # 126 75, # 127 75-2, # 128 76, # 129 77, # 130 78, # 131 79, # 132 81, # 133 82, # 134 83, # 135 84, # 136 85, # 137 86, # 138 87, # 139 88, # 140 89) (jeh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary Friedrich Enterprises, LLC. et al v. Marvel Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Friedrich Enterprises, LLC.
Represented By: Joseph D. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Friedrich
Represented By: Joseph D. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Steven T. Catlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Alastair Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Studios, Inc.
Represented By: Alastair Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Characters, Inc.
Represented By: Alastair Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasbro, Inc.
Represented By: Alastair Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Take Two Interactive Software, Inc.
Represented By: Alastair Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Tri-Star Motion Picture Group
Represented By: Steven T. Catlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Alastair Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Sky Pictures
Represented By: Alastair Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relativity Media L.L.C.
Represented By: Alastair Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael De Luca Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Alastair Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Alastair Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?