Krys et al v. Sugrue et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Stride, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis, Kenneth M. Krys and James P. Sinclair
Defendant: Christopher Pettit, Ingram Micro, Inc., Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., Tone N. Grant, Refco Associates, Inc., Scott A. Schoen, William T. Pigott, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Coast Asset Management, LLC, Santo Maggio, Bawag P.S.K., Joseph Collins, Ernst & Young U.S. LLP, Mayer Brown LLP, Mayer Brown International LLP, Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc., Thomas H. Lee, Mitchell Karlan, EMF Financial Products LLC, Brian Owens, Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, Tone Grant, Christopher Sugrue, Refco Alternative Investments LLC, Dennis Klejna, THL Managers V. LLC, Mari Ferris, Andrew Krieger, Edward S. Best, Mark Kavanagh, CIM Ventures, Inc, 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Paul Koury, EMF Core Fund LTD, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., Liberty Corner Capital Strategies, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., THL Equity Advisors V.L.P, Grant Thornton LLP, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Refco Group Holdings, Inc., Eric M. Flanagan, CS Land Management LLC, Bank Fur Arbeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Postparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft, Mark Ramler, Delta Flyer Fund LLC, Robert C. Trosten, Bank of America Securities LLC, Phillip R. Bennett, Scott L. Jaeckel, Pricewaterhousecoopers Cayman Islands, Thomas Hackl, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Beckenham Trading Co. Inc, Scott Kislin and David V. Harkins
Interested Party: Christopher Aliprandi and Peter R Ginsberg
Undetermined: Patrina Farquharson
Case Number: 1:2008cv03086
Filed: March 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1452
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2016 Filing 1127 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #1123 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. USCA Case Number 14-3480. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 08/23/2016. (nd)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #1123 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. USCA Case Number 14-3480(con). The parties have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal with prejudice, without costs or without attorneys' fees, as to Appellees Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, as successor-by-merger to Banc of America Securities LLC, and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, f/k/a Credit Suisse First Boston LLC. The stipulation is hereby so ordered. The appeal shall proceed with respect to the remaining appellee. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 06/15/2016. (nd)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADD DOCUMENTS TO DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET: THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY AGREED that the following documents (attached hereto as Exhibits A-D) shall be included in the District Court's docket and the record on appeal: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/15/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ama) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2015: #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit D) (ama).
April 16, 2015 First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Supplemental Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #1125 Stipulation and Order, #1124 Stipulation and Order, USCA Case Number 14-3480, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADD DOCUMENT TO DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET: THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY AGREED that the attached electronic communication dated May 3, 2010, from Daniel Capra to Helen B. Kim with the following two attachments: As set forth herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/10/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ama)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1123 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #1121 Judgment,. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-10106605. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Molton, David)
September 16, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #1123 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
September 16, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #1123 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #110: The Court directs the Case Accountant, Ball Baker Leake LLP, to make a final accounting of the funds set aside for expenses in these multidistrict litigation proceedings and disburse all remaining funds. Half of such funds shall be delivered to Plaintiffs' liaison counsel and the other half to Defendants' liaison counsel at their respective addresses listed herein. The Case Accountant is directed to close the account after disbursing the funds. The Court thanks the Case Accountant for its service in this matter. The Court directs liaison counsel to distribute the funds equitably among their respective constituents. The Court will retain jurisdiction over these matters for thirty days after the date of this order for the sole purpose of resolving any disputes that may arise concerning the allocation of funds. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/16/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(kgo)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 FINAL JUDGMENT: It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Final judgment is entered with respect to all claims against every defendant to the extent not previously entered on the docket in the Actions. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/16/2014) (kgo)
August 18, 2014 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (kgo)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #109: Pursuant to Case Management Order #108, the time has elapsed for objections to the Case Accountant's bill for services that were rendered between January and May 2014 and that will need to be rendered in winding down the fund over the next few weeks. Since the Court did not receive any objection to the bill, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bill forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/29/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(kgo)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #108: On July 16, 2014, the Court received a combined final bill from the Case Accountant that reflects not only the services that have been rendered between January and May 2014 but also the few additional services that will need to be rendered in winding down the fund over the next few weeks. The bill will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to the bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by July 24, 2014. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(kgo) Modified on 7/18/2014 (kgo).
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST BECKENHAM TRADING COMPANY INC. AND ANDREW KRIEGER: Plaintiffs and Defendants Beckenham Trading Company Inc. ("Beckenham") and Andrew Krieger ("Krieger") stipulate, pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to the dismissal with prejudice of all claims in the above-captioned action against Beckenham and Krieger. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/15/2014) (kgo)
June 25, 2014 Filing 1117 AMENDED JUDGMENT amending (2053 in 1:07-md-1902-JSR) Clerk's Judgment, That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated May 29, 2014, Because no objections to the Report and Recommendation, judgment is hereby entered in favor of plaintiffs and against defendants Sugrue, Bennett, Grant, RGHI, and Hackl, jointly and severally, in the sum of $671,723,896.08, which reflects defendants liability as of May 29, 2014. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/25/2014) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal, #2 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(dt)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 STIPULATION AND ORDER: In light of the foregoing shown herein, it is hereby stipulated and agreed, and ordered by the Court, as follows: The Court will continue to hold the Default Motion in abeyance until July 8, 2014. The Court's Order of February 18, 2014 will continue to be deemed vacated, but, if Beckenham and/or Krieger fail to satisfy their payment obligations to Plaintiffs by July 8, 2014, such Order will be reinstated. Under no circumstances whatsoever will any party seek, directly or indirectly, to further delay any aspect of this case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/30/2014) (kgo)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 ERRATA re: (1111 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Stipulation and Order. The Order dated May 29, 2014 in the above-captioned cases is hereby amended: (1) to add "Tone Grant," after "Bennett," on line 5 of page 1, and (2) to add "Grant," after "Bennett," on line 12 of page 1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/3/2014) (kgo)
June 2, 2014 Filing 1114 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated May 29, 2014, Because no objections to the Report and Recommendation, judgment is hereby entered in favor of plaintiffs and against defendants Sugrue, Bennett, RGHI, and Hackl, jointly and severally, in the sum of $671,723,896.08, which reflects defendants' liability as of May 29, 2014. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/2/2014) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal, #2 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(dt) (Main Document 1114 replaced on 6/3/2014) (dt).
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 ORDER re: (1109 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Report and Recommendations - Special Master. On May 2, 2014, Special Master Ronald Hedges issued a Report and Recommendation in the above-captioned cases recommending that judgment be entered in favor of plaintiffs and against each of defendants Christopher Sugrue, Phillip Bennett, Refco Group Holdings, Inc. ("RGHI"), and Thomas Hackl, jointly and severally, in the sum of $669,370,991.88, plus $78,430.14 for each day after April 29, 2014 until the date judgment is entered. Because no objections to the Report and Recommendation have been filed, the Court hereby adopts by reference the May 2 Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiffs and against defendants Sugrue, Bennett, RGHI, and Hackl, jointly and severally, in the sum of $671,723,896.08, which reflects defendants' liability as of May 29, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/29/2014) (kgo)
June 2, 2014 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (1113 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(kgo)
June 2, 2014 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #1113 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kgo)
May 29, 2014 Filing 1112 Costs Taxed as to #1110 USCA Mandate, USCA Case Number 12-3586(con). in the amount of $231.80. on 5/29/2014 in favor of Appellees William T. Pigott and Liberty Corner Capital Strategies, LLC; in the amount of $87.20 in favor of Appellees Ingram Micro, Inc. and CIM Ventures, Inc. against Krys et al.. (nd)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 STIPULATION AND ORDER: in light of the foregoing shown herein, it is hereby stipulated and agreed, and ordered by the Court, as follows: The Court will continue to hold the Default Motion in abeyance until July 8, 2014. The Court's Order of February 18, 2014 will continue to be deemed vacated, but, if Beckenham and/or Krieger fail to satisfy their payment obligations to Plaintiffs by July 8, 2014, such Order will be reinstated. Under no circumstances whatsoever will any party seek, directly or indirectly, to further delay any aspect of this case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/28/2014) (kgo)
May 22, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/22/2014. (Kotowski, Linda)
May 9, 2014 Filing 1110 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #796 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis USCA Case Number 12-3586 (con). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED and the request for leave to amend the Amended Complaint is DENIED in accordance with the opinion of this court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/09/2014. (nd)
May 2, 2014 Filing 1109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, I recommend that judgment be entered judgment in favor of Plaintiffs against each of Sugrue, Bennett, Grant, RGHI, and Hackl, jointly and severally, in the sum of $669,370,991.88, plus $78,430.14 for each day after April 29, 2014, until the date judgment is entered. Objections to R&R due by 5/19/2014 (Signed by Special Master Ronald Hedges on 5/2/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mro)
April 30, 2014 Filing 1108 DECLARATION of Joan A. Lipton, CPA/ABV/CFF, Ph.D re: (1103 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 955 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 2040 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Scheduling Order,,,, . Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
April 30, 2014 Filing 1107 DECLARATION of Kenneth M. Krys re: (955 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1103 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 2040 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Scheduling Order,,,, . Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
April 28, 2014 Filing 1106 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST BAWAG: Plaintiffs and Defendant BAWAG P.S.K. Bank fur Arbeit und Wirtschaft und Osterreichische Postsparkasse Aktiengesellschaft ("BAWAG") stipulate, pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to the dismissal with prejudice of all claims in the above-captioned action against BAWAG. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/27/2014) (kgo)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 BAR ORDER granting (2038) Motion for Bar Order in case 1:07-md-01902-JSR. NOW, THEREFORE, it is hereby: ORDERED that all the Barred Persons, are hereby permanently barred, enjoined and restrained from commencing, prosecuting, or asserting in this Court, in any federal or state court, or in any other court, arbitration proceeding, administrative agency, or other forum in the United States or elsewhere any claim for non-contractual indemnity or contribution against any DB Released Party (including any other non-contractual claim against the DB Released Parties), whether or not denominated as for contribution or indemnity, where the injury to the Barred Person is the liability of the Barred Person to the SPhinX Releasing Parties, arising out of or reasonably flowing from the claims or allegations in any of the Released Claims or the Out-Of-Scope Causes of Action whether arising under state, federal or foreign law as claims, cross-claims, counterclaims, or third-party claims (collectively, the "Barred Claims"). If a court or tribunal determines that Barred Claims exist that would have given rise to liability of any DB Released Party to a Barred Person but for this Order, the Barred Persons are also entitled to the judgment reduction provisions set forth herein. This Order (the "Bar Order") is without prejudice to the position of any party as to the existence, in the absence of this Bar Order, of any Barred Claim; and it is further ORDERED that in the event any SPhinX Releasing Party asserts an Out-Of-Scope Cause of Action against any Barred Person based upon, arising from, or related to the facts, allegations, or transactions underlying any Released Claims (the "Action"), then, prior to entry of any judgment or arbitration award ("Judgment") in the Action, the Plaintiff shall provide notice of this Bar Order to legal counsel for the Barred Person in the Action. The court or tribunal hearing the Action may determine whether the Action gives rise to Barred Claims on which DB Released Parties would have been liable to the Barred Persons in the absence of this Bar Order. If the court or tribunal so determines, it shall reduce any Judgment against such Barred Person in accordance with the provisions of New York General Obligations Law 15-108(a). For the avoidance of doubt, nothing herein shall be deemed to permit a Plaintiff to recover more than a single satisfaction with respect to any Out-Of-Scope Causes of Action; and it is further ORDERED that if any Plaintiff enters into a settlement with any Person with respect to one or more causes of action based upon, arising from, or related to the Released Claims or any transaction underlying any Released Claim, then such Plaintiff shall cause to be included a dismissal, release and waiver of any Barred Claims with respect to such settlement; and it is further ORDERED that this Court shall retain continuing jurisdiction with respect to all matters concerning this Bar Order, including, without limitation, hearing a petition for relief by a Barred Person or any other party in interest in the event that a court or tribunal hearing the Action fails to apply the judgment reduction provisions of this Bar Order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/19/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al. ***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, docketed in all member cases. (mro)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 BAR ORDER granting (2035) Motion for Bar Order in case 1:07-md-01902-JSR. NOW, THEREFORE, it is hereby: ORDERED that all Barred Persons are hereby permanently barred, enjoined and restrained from commencing, prosecuting, or asserting in this Court, in any federal or state court, or in any other court, arbitration proceeding, administrative agency, or other forum in the United States or elsewhere (including the courts of the Cayman Islands) any claim for non-contractual indemnity or contribution against any BAWAG Released Party (including any other non-contractual claim against the BAWAG Released Parties), whether or not denominated as for contribution or indemnity, where the injury to the Barred Person is the liability of the Barred Person to the SPhinX Releasing Parties, arising out of or reasonably flowing from the claims or allegations in any of the Released Claims or the Out-of-Scope Causes of Action, whether arising under state, federal or foreign law as claims, cross-claims, counterclaims, or third-party claims (collectively, the "Barred Claims"). If a court or tribunal determines that Barred Claims exist that would have given rise to liability of any BAWAG Released Party to a Barred Person but for this Order, the Barred Persons are also entitled to the judgment reduction provisions set forth herein. This Order (the "Bar Order") is without prejudice to the position of any party as to the existence, in the absence of this Bar Order, of any Barred Claim; and it is further ORDERED that in the event any SPhinX Releasing Party asserts an Out-of-Scope Cause of Action against any Barred Person based upon, arising from, or related to the facts, allegations, or transactions underlying any Released Claims (the "Action"), then, prior to entry of any judgment or arbitration award ("Judgment") in the Action, the Plaintiff shall provide notice of this Bar Order to legal counsel for the Barred Person in the Action. The court or tribunal hearing the Action may determine whether the Action gives rise to Barred Claims on which BAWAG Released Parties would have been liable to the Barred Persons in the absence of this Bar Order. If the court or tribunal so determines, it shall reduce any Judgment against such Barred Person in accordance with the provisions of New York General Obligations Law 15-108(a). For the avoidance of doubt, nothing herein shall be deemed to permit a Plaintiff to recover more than a single satisfaction with respect to any Out-of-Scope Causes of Action; as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/19/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al. ***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, docketed in all member cases. (mro) Modified on 3/20/2014 (mro).
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 ORDER REGARDING REVISED BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR INQUEST ON DAMAGES: Plaintiffs may serve and file: (i) a written submission on damages; (ii) disclosure regarding any expert opinions they may seek to introduce in connection with the damages inquest; and (iii) any proposed exhibits they may seek to introduce as part of their case-in-chief on damages in this matter on or before March 21, 2014. Defendant Grant may serve and file (i) a responsive written submission on damages; (ii) disclosure regarding any responsive expert opinions he may seek to introduce in connection with the damages inquest; and (iii) any proposed exhibits that he may seek to introduce as part of his responsive case on damages in this matter on or before April 11, 2014. The hearing on damages in connection with the default judgments will be held on April 29, 2014, commencing at 10:00 a.m. Eastern Daylight Time, at the offices of Brown Rudnick LLP, 7 Times Square, 47th Floor, New York, New York 10036. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 3/7/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ft)
February 28, 2014 Filing 1102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Bawag P.S.K. Bank Fur Arbeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Postsparkasse Aktiengesellschaft. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Jacoby, Nicolle)
February 28, 2014 Filing 1101 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1100 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 2035 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 952 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) JOINT MOTION for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order.. Document filed by Bank Fur Arbeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Postparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft, Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Jacoby, Nicolle)
February 28, 2014 Filing 1100 JOINT MOTION for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order. Document filed by Bank Fur Arbeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Postparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft, Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Jacoby, Nicolle)
February 28, 2014 Filing 1099 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicolle Lipper Jacoby on behalf of Bank Fur Arbeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Postparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft. (Jacoby, Nicolle)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON LIABILITY: NOW, THEREFORE, in light of the foregoing, it is hereby stipulated and agreed, and ordered by the Court, as follows: 1. The Court will hold the Default Motion in abeyance until the earlier of (i) May 20, 2014 (the date on which final payment of the settlement amount is due from defendants Beckenham and Krieger) or (ii) notification by Plaintiffs that there has been a failure by Defendants Beckenham and/or Krieger to comply with their obligations under the Settlement Agreement. 2. The Court's Order of February 18, 2014 is hereby vacated, but, if Defendants Beckenham and Krieger fail to comply with the terms of the Settlement Agreement, such Order shall be reinstated. 3. No further extension of the Court's consideration of the Default Motion shall be sought. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/27/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mro)
February 28, 2014 Filing 1097 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yelena Shreyberg on behalf of Bank Fur Arbeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Postparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft. (Shreyberg, Yelena)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 ORDER REGARDING THE BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR INQUEST ON DAMAGES: The date set forth for the written submissions by plaintiffs and defendant Grant on the damages in this matter are adjourned pending further order of the Special Master; The hearing on damages in connection with the default judgment against defendant Grant is adjourned pending further order of the Special Master; A telephonic conference regarding the inquest on damages will be held on March 4, 2014 at 4:00p.m. EST. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant Grant are directed to participate. Counsel for plaintiffs is further directed to arrange for and circulate a dial in conference call number for said telephonic conference. To the extent either or both of defendants Beckenham or Krieger fail to pay the fines set in Judge Rakoff's February 18, 2014 Order, counsel for such nonpaying party is also directed to participate in the telephonic status conference on March 4, 2014, as set in the immediately preceding paragraph, given the potential that the issue of damages with respect to such nonpaying defendant(s) will also be referred to the Special Master by the Court. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/4/2014 at 04:00 PM before Special Master Ronald J. Hedges.) (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 2/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mro)
February 20, 2014 Filing 1095 LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rafoff from Arthur "Scott" L. Porter, Jr. dated 1/29/2014 re: Please accept this letter as the response of Defendants Beckenham Trading Co., Inc. and Andrew Krieger (together, "Beckenham Defendants") to the letter submitted by Plaintiffs dated January 27, 2014, at the Court's invitation. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, Christopher Stride, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, Christopher Stride.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ft)
February 20, 2014 Filing 1094 LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rafoff from Lee M. Andelin dated 1/27/2014 re: Counsel writes on behalf of Plaintiffs to outline the specific defaults of Defendants Beckenham Trading Co. and Andrew Krieger and the resulting abandonment of their defense of the claims against them. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, Christopher Stride, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., American Financial International Group - Asia, LLC, Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, Christopher Stride. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ft)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 ***VACATED pursuant to Stipulation and Order dated 2/28/2014***ORDER: The Beckenham defendants now seek to reopen consideration of this matter as to them on the basis that certain similarly situated defendants (who, however, did participate in the proceedings) have successfully moved to dismiss the claims against them. The Court expresses no view as to whether this assertion is correct. Rather, this Court is only willing to reopen consideration of the claims against defendant Andrew Krieger if he pays a fine of $25,000 by certified check or money order payable to the "Clerk of the Court, SDNY," to be received by the Clerk of the Court on or before February 28, 2014, as a sanction for his failure to participate these past years. As for defendant Beckenham Trading, the Court finds its failure to participate more egregious and therefore will only reopen consideration of the claims against it if it pays a fine of $50,000, again by certified check or money order payable to the a Clerk of the Court, SDNY," to be received by the Clerk of the Court on or before February 28, 2014. Upon notification of receipt of such payment, the Court will convene a conference call of plaintiffs and any of defendant that pays the fine to schedule further proceedings (including a determination of whether any of the fine should be allocated to plaintiffs for their extra expenses occasioned by these circumstances). If either or both Beckenham defendants do not timely make such payment, the Court will enter default judgment as to liability in favor of plaintiffs and against the nonpaying defendants, with damages to be assessed by the Court on an equitable basis. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mro) Modified on 2/28/2014 (mro).
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER: On March 8, 2012, this Court entered an Order directing that a default judgment be entered against defendant Thomas Hackl (MDL Docket No. 1415). A default judgment against defendant Hackl was entered that day (MDL Docket No. 1417). On February 16, 2012, this Court entered an Order directing that default judgments be entered against defendants Christopher Sugrue, Phillip Bennett, and Refco Group Holdings, Inc. ("RGHI") (MDL Docket No. 1389). A default judgment against defendants Sugrue, Bennett, and RGHI was entered on February 17, 2012 (MDL Docket No. 1394). The Court hereby refers the default judgments entered against defendants Hackl, Sugrue, Bennett, and RGHI to Special Master Ronald J. Hedges for an inquest on damages. Counsel for the plaintiffs are directed to contract the Special Master by February 24, 2014 to schedule further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/14/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ft)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 ORDER REGARDING THE BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR THE INQUEST ON DAMAGES RELATING TO DEFENDANT TIME GRANT: Plaintiffs may serve and file a written submission on the damages in this matter by February 24, 2014. Defendant may Grant may serve an file a responsive written submission on the damages in this matter by March 17, 2014. A hearing on damages in connection with the default judgment against defendant Grant will be heard before Special Master Hedges on March 20, 2014, at the offices of Brown Rudnick LLP, 7 Times Square, New York, New York 10036, 47th Floor. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 2/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ft) Modified on 2/18/2014 (ft).
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT: No further contributions will be required to be made by any party to the aforementioned bank account absent further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, the disposition of any remaining funds in the aforementioned account will await further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/29/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(ft)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1089 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST ROBERT C. TROSTEN: Plaintiffs and Defendant Robert C. Trosten ("Trosten") stipulate, pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to the dismissal with prejudice of all claims in the above-captioned action against Trosten. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ft)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ORDER granting (2002) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:07-md-01902-JSR; granting (927) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:08-cv-03065-JSR; granting (1074) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:08-cv-03086-JSR. The Court hereby grants default judgment as to liability against Tone Grant on consent. The Court refers this matter to Special Master Ron Hedges for an inquest as to damages. The parties should contact the Special Master by no later than February 3, 2014 to schedule further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/20/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR (ft)
January 21, 2014 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (2021 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1088 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 941 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Order on Motion for Default Judgment to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ft)
December 2, 2013 Filing 1087 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Helen Byung-Son Kim on behalf of Dennis Klejna. New Address: Thompson Coburn LLP, 2029 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles, CA, USA 90067, (310)282-2500. (Kim, Helen)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #107: Pursuant to Case Management Order #106, the time for objections to the Special Master's bill for services rendered in August and September 2013 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to the bill, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bill forthwith. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/16/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
October 11, 2013 Filing 1085 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion for Entry of Defaults and Default Judgments with Respect to Defendants Beckenham Trading Company, Inc., Andrew Krieger, and Tone Grant served on Kaplan & Levenson, P.C., 630 Third Avenue, Suite 501, New York, NY 10017 on 10/10/2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd.. (Dash, Andrew)
October 10, 2013 Filing 1084 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (927 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1074 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 2002 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Default Judgment as to /Notice of Consolidated Motion for Entry of Defaults and Entry of Default Judgements with Respect to Defendants Beckenham Trading Company, Inc., Andrew Krieger and Tone Grant.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Dash, Andrew)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The Court has received one Special Master bill for the month of September, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to the bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by October 9, 2013. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
October 4, 2013 Filing 1082 RESPONSE to Motion re: (1074 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Default Judgment as to /Notice of Consolidated Motion for Entry of Defaults and Entry of Default Judgements with Respect to Defendants Beckenham Trading Company, Inc., Andrew Krieger and Tone Grant.. Document filed by Tone N. Grant, Tone Grant. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Neish, Laura)
October 3, 2013 Filing 1081 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur L. Porter, JR on behalf of Beckenham Trading Co. Inc, Andrew Krieger. (Porter, Arthur)
October 3, 2013 Filing 1080 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1074 MOTION for Default Judgment as to /Notice of Consolidated Motion for Entry of Defaults and Entry of Default Judgements with Respect to Defendants Beckenham Trading Company, Inc., Andrew Krieger and Tone Grant.. Document filed by Beckenham Trading Co. Inc, Andrew Krieger. (Albert, Aaron)
October 3, 2013 Filing 1079 DECLARATION of Aaron E. Albert in Opposition re: #1074 MOTION for Default Judgment as to /Notice of Consolidated Motion for Entry of Defaults and Entry of Default Judgements with Respect to Defendants Beckenham Trading Company, Inc., Andrew Krieger and Tone Grant.. Document filed by Beckenham Trading Co. Inc, Andrew Krieger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bottom Line Order Adopting Spec Master Conclusions re RTL Dismissal, #2 Exhibit B - Memo Order re RTL Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C - Spec Master R&R re RTL Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D - Refco Bankruptcy Examiner Report (wo Exhibits))(Albert, Aaron)
October 3, 2013 Filing 1078 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Eliot Albert on behalf of Beckenham Trading Co. Inc, Andrew Krieger. (Albert, Aaron)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1077 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of (1) Notice of Consolidated Motion for Entry of Defaults and Entry of Default Judgments with Respect to Defendants Beckenham Trading Company, Inc., Andrew Krieger, and Tone Grant, (2) Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion for Entry of Defaults and Default Judgments with Respect to Defendants Beckenham Trading Company, Inc., Andrew Krieger, and Tone Grant, (3) Declaration of Andrew Dash in Support of Consolidated Motion for Entry Of Defaults and Default Judgments, with exhibits A through F thereto, and (4) [Proposed] Order for Entry of Defaults and Default Judgments served on Beckenham Trading Company, Inc, Andrew Krieger, Aaron E. Albert, Alan C. Thomas, Laura E. Neish and Shawn P. Naunton on 09/20/2013. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd.. (Dash, Andrew)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1076 DECLARATION of Andrew Dash in Support re: (2002 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 927 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1074 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Default Judgment as to /Notice of Consolidated Motion for Entry of Defaults and Entry of Default Judgements with Respect to Defendants Beckenham Trading Company, Inc., Andrew Krieger and Tone Grant.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3), #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Dash, Andrew)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1075 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (927 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1074 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 2002 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Default Judgment as to /Notice of Consolidated Motion for Entry of Defaults and Entry of Default Judgements with Respect to Defendants Beckenham Trading Company, Inc., Andrew Krieger and Tone Grant.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Dash, Andrew)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1074 MOTION for Default Judgment as to /Notice of Consolidated Motion for Entry of Defaults and Entry of Default Judgements with Respect to Defendants Beckenham Trading Company, Inc., Andrew Krieger and Tone Grant. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Dash, Andrew)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to Case Management Order #104, the time for objections to the Special Master's bill for services rendered in August 2013 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to the bill, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bill forthwith. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/16/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #104: The Court has received one Special Master bill for the month of August, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to the bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by September 16, 2013. If no objections are received, the case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
September 4, 2013 Filing 1071 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Plaintiffs and Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP stipulate, pursuant to Rule 41 (a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to the dismissal with prejudice of all claims in the above-captioned action against PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP and Marl Ferris. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(cd)
August 30, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 8/30/2013. (Kotowski, Linda)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Notice is hereby given that Plaintiffs by and through their undersigned attorneys, and defendants Grant Thornton LLP and Mark Ramier (the "Grant Thornton defendants") hereby stipulate and agree that all claims and defenses asserted by or against the Plaintiffs and the Grant Thornton Defendants be dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses related thereto. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/27/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
August 26, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 8/26/2013. (Landers, Rigoberto)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM ORDER: On July 28, 2012, the Court issued a Memorandum Order reaffirming its earlier "bottom-line" Order of July 17, 2012,dismissing with prejudice plaintiffs' claims against Liberty Corner Capital Strategies, LLC; Ingram Micro, Inc.; CIM Ventures, Inc.; and William T. Piggot in the above-captioned case. On October 27, 2012, at the joint request of both sides, the Court filed an Order,pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), determining that there was no just reason to delay the entry of final judgment. The parties then briefed an appeal by plaintiffs to the Second Circuit, see Case No.08 Civ. 3065(JSR), ECF No. 668; but on August 2, 2013, the Second Circuit remanded the case, pursuant to United States v. Jacobson,15 F.3d 19 (2d Cir. 1994), directing the Court "to supplement the record with a reasoned, even if brief, explanation for why an immediate appeal of the dismissal of the claims against appellees is appropriate." See Case No. 08 Civ. 3065(JSR), ECF No. 849. The Court apologizes for not stating its reasons in its Order of October 27, 2012, since it is mindful that the possibility of piecemeal appeals imposes a potential burden on the appellate court. In granting the parties' joint request for the Rule 54(b)judgment, however, the Court, pursuant to Supreme Court precedent, took account of such factors as "whether the claims under review are separable from the others remaining to be adjudicated and whether the nature of the claims already determined is such that no appellate court would have to decide the same issues more than once," Curtiss-Wright Corp. v. General Elec. Co., 446 U.S. 1, 8 (1980), and determined that these requirements were met.Specifically, the claim brought against the four aforementioned defendants viz., that these defendants' borrowing from one Refco entity and lending to another Refco entity rendered them liable as aiders and abettors of the Refco fraud -- is unique to them. As for the Refco matters writ large, they are mostly finally resolved,largely through settlements, and, in any event, no remaining potential appeal to the Second Circuit from any aspect of the case seems likely to present issues that are not almost entirely distinct from those relating to the instant defendants. Plaintiffs are directed to file a copy of this Supplemental Order with the Clerk of the Court of the Second Circuit Court of Appeals, with the request that she forward it to the panel that issued the aforementioned remand Order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/22/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js) Modified on 8/26/2013 (js).
August 26, 2013 Filing 1068 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Support re: (476 in 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 917 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 281 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1992 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1067 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
August 26, 2013 Filing 1067 Objection re: (1716 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 216 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 686 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 834 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 380 in 1:08-cv-07416-JSR) Order,, /Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Appeal from Special Master Hedges' December 13, 2012 Order Regarding Spoliation of Evidence. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
August 22, 2013 Filing 1066 DECLARATION of Catherine W. Joyce in Support re: (1064 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Testimony of Richard C. Breeden.. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Joyce, Catherine)
August 22, 2013 Filing 1065 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1064 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Testimony of Richard C. Breeden.. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 22, 2013 Filing 1064 MOTION to Preclude the Testimony of Richard C. Breeden. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Return Date set for 9/4/2013 at 09:00 AM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 19, 2013 Filing 1063 DECLARATION of Luke A. Connelly in Support re: (1062 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 912 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1986 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 19, 2013 Filing 1062 Objection re: (908 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1982 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1057 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Order,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Appeal From Special Master Hedges' August 9, 2013 Order Denying Defendants' Request for a Sanction for Plaintiffs' Willful Spoliation of Evidence. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Counsel for Plaintiff and defendant hereby stipulate and agree that all claims and defenses asserted by or against the Plaintiffs and the Mayer Brown Defendants be dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses related thereto. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/16/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
August 15, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 8/15/2013. (Kotowski, Linda)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 103: Pursuant to Case Management Order #102, the time for objections to the Special Masters' bills for services rendered in July 2013 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to the bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/09/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(ama)
August 12, 2013 Filing 1059 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Annika Marie Goldman on behalf of Joseph Collins. (Goldman, Annika)
August 12, 2013 Filing 1058 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 ORDER: It is on this 9th day of August 2013, ordered as follows: 1. Defendants' request for an adverse inference jury instruction is denied for the reasons stated by the Special Master in the transcript of the telephonic hearing held on August 5, 2013. 2. The Special Master will not rule on a spoilation remedy in the matter of Krys v. Aaron, pending any transfer of that action to the United States District Court refer the matter to the Special Master for decision. (Signed by Special Master Ronald Hedges 8/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(js) Modified on 8/12/2013 (js).
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBIT UNDER SEAL: It is so ordered that plaintiffs' Application is granted. The Clerk shall file under seal Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Kevin LoVecchio in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine Regarding Issues of Appointment at Trial. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/7/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
August 8, 2013 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (1056 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Order,, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
August 7, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 8/7/2013. (Kotowski, Linda)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1055 DECLARATION of Lee M. Andelin in Support re: (863 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1012 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1936 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Stephen D. Lofchie., (1024 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 875 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1948 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Richard Millett., (1944 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1020 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 871 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Avram S. Tucker., (1016 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 867 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1940 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Reports of Proposed Defense Experts Gregory May, Steven Schwarcz, and John Coates., (1938 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 865 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1014 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Jerry W. Markham., (1010 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1934 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 861 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Patrick M. Connors., (1946 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1022 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 873 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Kenneth M. Lehn., (869 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1018 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1942 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Rene Stultz.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 39, #2 Exhibit 40, #3 Exhibit 41)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1054 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1024 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 875 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1948 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Richard Millett.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1053 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1946 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1022 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 873 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Kenneth M. Lehn.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1052 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1020 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1944 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 871 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Avram S. Tucker.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1051 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (869 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1018 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1942 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Rene Stultz.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1050 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1016 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 867 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1940 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Reports of Proposed Defense Experts Gregory May, Steven Schwarcz, and John Coates.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1049 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1014 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1938 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 865 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Jerry W. Markham.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1048 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (863 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1012 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1936 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Stephen D. Lofchie.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1047 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1010 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1934 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 861 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Patrick M. Connors.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1046 DECLARATION of Linda T Coberly re: (1041 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, In Support. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1045 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1020 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Avram S. Tucker.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1044 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1014 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Jerry W. Markham.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1043 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1018 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Rene Stultz.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1042 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1024 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Richard Millett.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1041 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1022 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Kenneth M. Lehn.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1040 DECLARATION of Catherine W Joyce re: #1033 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, In Support. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Joyce, Catherine)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1039 DECLARATION of Craig D. Singer in Opposition re: (1010 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Patrick M. Connors., (1012 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Stephen D. Lofchie., (1016 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Reports of Proposed Defense Experts Gregory May, Steven Schwarcz, and John Coates.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1038 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1010 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Patrick M. Connors.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1037 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1012 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Stephen D. Lofchie.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1036 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1016 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Reports of Proposed Defense Experts Gregory May, Steven Schwarcz, and John Coates.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1035 DECLARATION of John Williams in Support re: (1007 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION in Limine Regarding Issues of Apportionment at Trial.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1034 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1007 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION in Limine Regarding Issues of Apportionment at Trial.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1033 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (852 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1925 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1001 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of R. David Wallace.. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(Coberly, Linda)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1032 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Opposition re: (1007 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 858 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1931 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION in Limine Regarding Issues of Apportionment at Trial.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1031 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1931 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1007 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 858 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION in Limine Regarding Issues of Apportionment at Trial.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1030 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Opposition re: (1928 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1004 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 855 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Richard Breeden.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1029 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1928 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1004 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 855 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Richard Breeden.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1028 DECLARATION of Malcom Loeb in Opposition re: (1925 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1001 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 852 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of R. David Wallace.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Loeb, Malcolm)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1027 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (852 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1925 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1001 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of R. David Wallace.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Loeb, Malcolm)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1026 DECLARATION of Lee M. Andelin in Support re: (863 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1012 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1936 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Stephen D. Lofchie., (1024 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 875 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1948 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Richard Millett., (865 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1938 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1014 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Jerry W. Markham., (1010 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1934 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 861 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Patrick M. Connors., (1022 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1946 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 873 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Kenneth M. Lehn., (871 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1944 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1020 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Avram S. Tucker., (867 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1940 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1016 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Reports of Proposed Defense Experts Gregory May, Steven Schwarcz, and John Coates., (1018 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1942 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 869 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Rene Stultz.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 (Part 1 of 4), #12 Exhibit 11 (Part 2 of 4), #13 Exhibit 11 (Part 3 of 4), #14 Exhibit 11 (Part 4 of 4), #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25 (Part 1 of 4), #29 Exhibit 25 (Part 2 of 4), #30 Exhibit 25 (Part 3 of 4), #31 Exhibit 25 (Part 4 of 4), #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28 (Part 1 of 7), #35 Exhibit 28 (Part 2 of 7), #36 Exhibit 28 (Part 3 of 7), #37 Exhibit 28 (Part 4 of 7), #38 Exhibit 28 (Part 5 of 7), #39 Exhibit 28 (Part 6 of 7), #40 Exhibit 28 (Part 7 of 7), #41 Exhibit 29, #42 Exhibit 30, #43 Exhibit 31, #44 Exhibit 32 (Part 1 of 5), #45 Exhibit 32 (Part 2 of 5), #46 Exhibit 32 (Part 3 of 5), #47 Exhibit 32 (Part 4 of 5), #48 Exhibit 32 (Part 5 of 5), #49 Exhibit 33, #50 Exhibit 34, #51 Exhibit 35, #52 Exhibit 36, #53 Exhibit 37, #54 Exhibit 38)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1025 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1024 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 875 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1948 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Richard Millett.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1024 MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Richard Millett. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Return Date set for 8/16/2013 at 04:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1023 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1946 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1022 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 873 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Kenneth M. Lehn.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1022 MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Kenneth M. Lehn. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Return Date set for 8/16/2013 at 04:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1021 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1020 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1944 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 871 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Avram S. Tucker.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1020 MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Avram S. Tucker. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Return Date set for 8/16/2013 at 04:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1019 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (869 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1018 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1942 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Rene Stultz.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1018 MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Rene Stultz. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Return Date set for 8/16/2013 at 04:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1017 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1016 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 867 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1940 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Reports of Proposed Defense Experts Gregory May, Steven Schwarcz, and John Coates.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1016 MOTION to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Reports of Proposed Defense Experts Gregory May, Steven Schwarcz, and John Coates. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Return Date set for 8/16/2013 at 04:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1015 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1014 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1938 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 865 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Jerry W. Markham.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1014 MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Jerry W. Markham. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Return Date set for 8/16/2013 at 04:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1013 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (863 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1012 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1936 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Stephen D. Lofchie.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1012 MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Stephen D. Lofchie. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Return Date set for 8/16/2013 at 04:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1011 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1010 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1934 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 861 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Patrick M. Connors.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1010 MOTION to Preclude /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Patrick M. Connors. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Return Date set for 8/16/2013 at 04:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1009 DECLARATION of Kevin M. LoVecchio in Support re: (1007 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION in Limine Regarding Issues of Apportionment at Trial.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 3-6, #2 Exhibits 7-8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1008 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1007 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION in Limine Regarding Issues of Apportionment at Trial.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1007 MOTION in Limine Regarding Issues of Apportionment at Trial. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1006 DECLARATION of Craig D. Singer in Support re: (1004 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Richard Breeden.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1005 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1004 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Richard Breeden.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1004 MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of Richard Breeden. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1003 DECLARATION of Linda T. Coberly in Support re: (1001 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of R. David Wallace.. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1002 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1001 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of R. David Wallace.. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1001 MOTION to Preclude the Opinions and Testimony of R. David Wallace. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Return Date set for 8/16/2013 at 04:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #102: The Court has received the Special Masters' bills for the month of July, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to a bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by August 9, 2013. If no objections are received (the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(ja)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The request for an order compelling production of unredacted copies of the Transcripts is granted, in part, as follows: a. Plaintiffs are to produce Exhibit 2 with the following redactions removed: (i) on page 55, the second sentence of the second redaction; (ii) on page 55, the entire third redaction; (iii) on page 99, the bottom-most redaction; (iv) on page 100, the first redaction; and b. Plaintiffs are to produce Exhibit 6 with the following redactions removed: (i) on page 144, all redactions; (ii) on page 145, all redactions. 2. Plaintiffs' remaining redactions appear appropriate. 3. It is further ordered that on August 8, 2013, unless Plaintiffs have produced an appropriate Sealing Order or other similar ruling from the Grand Court of the Cayman Islands supporting the redaction of the Transcripts, Plaintiffs are to produce copies of the Transcripts with all redactions removed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Special Master, Ronald Hedges on 8/5/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ja) Modified on 8/9/2013 (ja).
August 5, 2013 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #998 USCA Mandate. (tp)
August 2, 2013 Filing 998 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #796 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis USCA Case Number 12-3586(C). ON CONSIDERATION WHEREOF, it is now hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that the matter be remanded for supplementation of the record consistent with this order. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 8/2/2013. (tp)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 997 ORDER: Consequently, the Court hereby grants the plaintiffs' application to serve a trial subpoena upon Joseph Collins. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/31/2013) (js)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 996 ORDER: Consequently, the Court hereby grants the plaintiffs' application to serve trial subpoena upon Joseph Collins. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/31/2013) (js)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 995 MEMORANDUM ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is hereby denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/31/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(js)
August 1, 2013 Filing 994 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Timothy Joseph. Paris on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M Krys. New Address: BEUS GILBERT PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, U.S.A. 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR(Paris, Timothy)
July 29, 2013 Filing 993 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: It is on this 29th day of July 2013, ordered as follows: 1. Plaintiffs may file an opposition to the Application, limited to three single-spaced pages, on or before July 31, 2013. 2. defendants may file a reply in further support of the Application, limited to two single-spaced pages, on or before August 1, 2013; and 3. The Special Master will conduct a telephonic hearing on August 5, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. EDT. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 7/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR(js)
July 17, 2013 Filing 992 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1735 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 705 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 991 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #101: Pursuant to Case Management Order #100, the time for Objections to the Special Masters' bills for services rendered in June 2013 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to the bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay bills forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(rsh)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 990 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #100: The Court has received the Special Masters' bills for the month of June, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to a bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by July 8, 2013. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/1/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
July 1, 2013 Filing 989 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1896 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 271 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 822 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 973 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration.. Document filed by Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Anker, Philip)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 988 ORDER: After the parties submitted objections to the R&Rs, the Court received full briefing on all the objections, followed by an"omnibus" oral argument on June 6, 2013. In addition, certain supplemental written materials were received. Having now considered the entire matter de novo, the Court concludes that the Special Master had it essentially correct and that, therefore, all four motions for summary judgment should be denied. An opinion explaining the Court's reasons for these rulings will issue in due course. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close documents numbered 696, 701, 705, and 709 on the docket of Case No. 08 Civ. 3065(JSR),as well as the equivalent documents in Case Nos. 08 Civ. 3086(JSR)and 07 MDL 1902(JSR).. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/24/2013) (js) (js).
June 24, 2013 Filing 987 DECLARATION of Lee M Andelin in Support re: (983 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 832 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1906 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Jerry W. Markham., (1905 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 982 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 831 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Stephen D. Lofchie., (1909 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 986 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 835 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Avram S. Tucker., (1898 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 824 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 975 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Patrick M. Connors., (833 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 984 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1907 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Reports of Proposed Defense Experts Gregory May, Steven Schwarcz, and John Coates., (978 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1901 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 827 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Propsed Defense Expert Richard Millett., (985 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1908 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 834 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Rene Stultz., (1902 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 979 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 828 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Kenneth M. Lehn.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 (1 of 4), #12 Exhibit 11 (2 of 4), #13 Exhibit 11 (3 of 4), #14 Exhibit 11 (4 of 4), #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25 (1 of 4), #29 Exhibit 25 (2 of 4), #30 Exhibit 25 (3 of 4), #31 Exhibit 25 (4 of 4), #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28 (1 of 7), #35 Exhibit 28 (2 of 7), #36 Exhibit 28 (3 of 7), #37 Exhibit 28 (4 of 7), #38 Exhibit 28 (5 of 7), #39 Exhibit 28 (6 of 7), #40 Exhibit 28 (7 of 7), #41 Exhibit 29, #42 Exhibit 30, #43 Exhibit 31, #44 Exhibit 32 (1 of 5), #45 Exhibit 32 (2 of 5), #46 Exhibit 32 (3 of 5), #47 Exhibit 32 (4 of 5), #48 Exhibit 32 (5 of 5), #49 Exhibit 33, #50 Exhibit 34, #51 Exhibit 35, #52 Exhibit 36, #53 Exhibit 37, #54 Exhibit 38)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
June 24, 2013 Filing 986 MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Avram S. Tucker. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
June 24, 2013 Filing 985 MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Rene Stultz. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
June 24, 2013 Filing 984 MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Reports of Proposed Defense Experts Gregory May, Steven Schwarcz, and John Coates. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
June 24, 2013 Filing 983 MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Jerry W. Markham. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
June 24, 2013 Filing 982 MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Stephen D. Lofchie. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
June 24, 2013 Filing 981 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (979 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1902 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 828 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Kenneth M. Lehn.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
June 24, 2013 Filing 980 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (978 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 827 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1901 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Propsed Defense Expert Richard Millett.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
June 24, 2013 Filing 979 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Kenneth M. Lehn. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M Krys.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
June 24, 2013 Filing 978 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Propsed Defense Expert Richard Millett. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M Krys.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
June 24, 2013 Filing 977 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (824 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1898 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 975 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Patrick M. Connors.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
June 24, 2013 Filing 976 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #978) - MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony and Strike Report of Proposed Defense Expert Richard Millett. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M Krys.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee) Modified on 6/25/2013 (ldi).
June 24, 2013 Filing 975 MOTION in Limine /Notice of Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Strike the Report of Proposed Defense Expert Patrick M. Connors. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
June 21, 2013 Filing 974 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1896 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 271 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 822 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 973 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
June 21, 2013 Filing 973 MOTION for Reconsideration re; (260 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 959 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 808 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1882 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Plaintiffs' Limited Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
June 19, 2013 Filing 972 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Scot Christopher Stirling on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. New Address: Beus Gilbert PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, United States 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Stirling, Scot)
June 19, 2013 Filing 971 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lowell Richard Williams on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. New Address: Beus Gilbert PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, United States 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Williams, Lowell)
June 19, 2013 Filing 970 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Malcolm Loeb on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M Krys. New Address: Beus Gilbert PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, United States 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR(Loeb, Malcolm)
June 19, 2013 Filing 969 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas A. Connelly on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. New Address: Beus Gilbert PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, United States 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Connelly, Thomas)
June 19, 2013 Filing 968 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Leo R. Beus on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. New Address: Beus Gilbert PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, United States 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Beus, Leo)
June 19, 2013 Filing 967 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Britton M. Worthen on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. New Address: Beus Gilbert PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, United States 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Worthen, Britton)
June 18, 2013 Filing 966 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dennis Blackhurst on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. New Address: Beus Gilbert PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, United States 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Blackhurst, Dennis)
June 18, 2013 Filing 965 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas A. Gilson on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. New Address: Beus Gilbert PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, United States 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Gilson, Thomas)
June 18, 2013 Filing 964 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert T. Mills on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. New Address: Beus Gilbert PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, United States 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Mills, Robert)
June 18, 2013 Filing 963 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lee M. Andelin on behalf of Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. New Address: Beus Gilbert PLLC, 701 North 44th Street, Phoenix, Arizona, United States 85008, (480) 429-3000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 962 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #99: Pursuant to Case Management Order #98, the time for objections to the Special Master Capra's bill for services rendered in May 2013 and Special Master Hedges's bill for services rendered in April and May 2013 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to the bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 961 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT: For the reasons set forth in the transcript, Plaintiffs motion is denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 6/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
June 10, 2013 Filing 960 NON-PARTY MOTION OF PETER JAMES TO QUASH SUBPOENA AD TESTIFICANDUM..(sc)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 959 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Accordingly, the Court hereby confirms its bottom-line Order adopting the Special Master's Report and Recommendation in part, but granting the motions of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP; Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, as successor-by-merger to Bane of America Securities LLC; and Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. for summary judgment on the remaining claims against them in the above captioned cases. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/6/2013) filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(djc) Modified on 6/6/2013 (djc).
June 6, 2013 Filing 958 DECLARATION of VERONICA E. RENDON in Support re: #957 Opposition Brief. Document filed by Delta Flyer Fund LLC, EMF Financial Products LLC, Eric M. Flanagan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rendon, Veronica)
June 6, 2013 Filing 957 OPPOSITION BRIEF TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Document filed by Delta Flyer Fund LLC, EMF Financial Products LLC, Eric M. Flanagan.(Rendon, Veronica)
June 5, 2013 Filing 956 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (943 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint.. Document filed by CIM Ventures, Inc, Ingram Micro, Inc., Liberty Corner Capital Strategies, LLC, William T. Pigott. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Marino, Kevin)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 955 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #98: The Court has received Special Master Capra's bill for the month of May as well as Special Master Hedges's bill for the months of April and May, which will be docketed for the parties, review. Any party who wishes to object to a bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by June 10, 2013. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. ( See attached bills) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/3/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js) Modified on 6/5/2013 (js).
June 4, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. #947 HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney John David Tortorella : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. (ldi)
June 4, 2013 Filing 954 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (1867 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 792 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 943 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint.. Document filed by Bank Fur Arbeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Postparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft, Bawag P.S.K. Bank Fur Arbeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Postsparkasse Aktiengesellschaft, Bunk Fur Albeit Und Wirtschaft Und Osterreichische Posteparkasse Aktiengesellsehaft. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Jacoby, Nicolle)
June 4, 2013 Filing 953 DECLARATION of James J. Capra, Jr. in Opposition re: (1867 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 792 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 943 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint.. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
June 4, 2013 Filing 952 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (1867 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 792 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 943 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint.. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
June 4, 2013 Filing 951 DECLARATION of Walter Rieman in Opposition re: (1867 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 792 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 943 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint.. Document filed by 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, David V. Harkins, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee, Scott A. Schoen, THL Managers V. LLC, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., THL Equity Advisors V, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Rieman, Walter)
June 4, 2013 Filing 950 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1867 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 792 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 943 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint.. Document filed by 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee, Scott A. Schoen, THL Managers V. LLC, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., David V. Harkins, THL Equity Advisors V, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Rieman, Walter)
June 4, 2013 Filing 949 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1867 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 792 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 943 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint.. Document filed by Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Anker, Philip)
June 4, 2013 Filing 948 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (1867 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 792 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 943 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
June 4, 2013 Filing 947 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - REPLY to Response to Motion re: #943 MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint.. Document filed by CIM Ventures, Inc, Ingram Micro, Inc., Liberty Corner Capital Strategies, LLC, William T. Pigott. (Tortorella, John) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ldi).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 946 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that the law firm of Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP hereby is substituted for Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP as counsel of record for Defendant Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC("Credit Suisse") in the above-captioned action. Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP remains counsel of record for Defendants Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated,as successor-by-merger to Banc of America Securities LLC, and JP Morgan Chase & Co. Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP requests that a copy of all papers henceforth served in this action be served upon Herbert S. Washer, a member of the firm, at the firm's office located at 80 Pine Street, New York, New York, 10005-1702. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 6/4/2013) (js) Modified on 6/4/2013 (js).
May 31, 2013 Filing 945 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Support re: (788 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 939 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1863 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Response,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
May 30, 2013 Filing 944 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy E. Millard on behalf of Paul Koury (Millard, Amy)
May 30, 2013 Filing 943 MOTION to Amend/Correct (129 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) for Leave to Amend Complaint. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
May 29, 2013 Filing 942 DECLARATION of Linda T. Coberly in Support re: (1865 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 256 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 941 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 790 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Response,,. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
May 29, 2013 Filing 941 RESPONSE re: (930 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 780 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1849 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation Addressing Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
May 29, 2013 Filing 940 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE CORRECTED ENTRY# 945) DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Support re: (788 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 939 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1863 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Response,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Simpson Decl, #2 Exhibit 2 to Simpson Decl, #3 Exhibit 3 to Simpson Decl)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David) Modified on 6/12/2013 (kj).
May 29, 2013 Filing 939 RESPONSE re: (931 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 781 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1850 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) /Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objection to the Report and Recommendation Addressing Their Motions for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 938 ORDER for ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Hank E. Pearson is admitted Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth M.Krys and Margot Macinnis (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/23/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND: it is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs' motion for leave toamend is DENIED for the reasons stated by the Special Master at the hearing, WITHOUTPREJUDICE to Plaintiffs' submitting a formal motion for leave to amend.Should Plaintiffs choose to pursue a motion for leave to amend their pleading, the briefing on any such motion will proceed as follows:1. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend, if any, must be filed no later than May 29, 2013, and must be accompanied by a proposed amended pleading, along with a copy of the amended pleading with any additions underlined and deletions struck though. Defendants' opposition to the motion must be filed and served no later than June 4, 2013. 3. Plaintiffs and Defendants may, if they prefer, submit the letter briefs they submitted inconnection with Plaintiffs' recent motion for leave to amend as their memorandum in support oropposition to the formal motion for leave to amend, should Plaintiffs choose to pursue one. 4. Oral argument will be heard by Special Master Hedges telephonically at 4:00 p.m. on June 5, 2013 (Signed by Special Master on 5/22/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. in case 1:07-md-01902-JSR; granting (935) Motion for Hank E. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-03086-JSR; granting (977) Motion for Hank E. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:07-md-01902-JSR. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 5/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(rdz)
May 15, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (935 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Hank Edward Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8508925. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (785 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Hank Edward Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8508886. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (447 in 1:08-cv-07416-JSR) MOTION for Hank Edward Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8508948. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR(bcu)
May 14, 2013 Filing 935 MOTION for Hank Edward Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8508925. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx LTD, Sphinx Strategy Fund, LTD, Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed LTD, Sphinx Merger Arbitrage LTD, Sphinx Macro LTD, Sphinx Long/Short Equity LTD, Sphinx Managed Futures LTD et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Pearson, Hank)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 934 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #97: Pursuant to Case Management Order #96, the time for objections to Special Master Capra's bill for services rendered in April 2013 has elapsed. Since the Court id not receive any objection to the bill, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bill forthwith. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/13/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND PLEADING: SPECIAL MASTER RONALD J. HEDGES, for good cause shown, hereby orders as follows: 1. Plaintiffs may submit a letter brief regarding their request to amend by Friday, May 10, 2013. 2. Defendants may file a responsive brief by Wednesday, May 15, 2013. 3. Oral argument will be heard by Judge Hedges telephonically on Thursday, May 16, 2013 at 2 p.m. EDT( Responses due by 5/15/2013), ( Oral Argument set for 5/16/2013 at 02:00 PM before Special Master.) (Signed by Special Master on 5/13/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
May 10, 2013 Filing 932 DECLARATION of Craig D. Singer in Support re: (931 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 781 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1850 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2, #2 Exhibits 3-4, #3 Exhibits 5-11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibits 13-24)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
May 10, 2013 Filing 931 Objection re: (925 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Report and Recommendations Regarding Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
May 10, 2013 Filing 930 Objection re: (925 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 775 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1843 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Report and Recommendations /Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 929 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #96: the Court has received Special Master Capra's bill for the month of April, which will be docketed for the parties review. Any party who wishes to object to this bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by May 13, 2013. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bill out of the established account (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/6/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
May 1, 2013 Filing 928 DECLARATION of John S. Williams in Support re: (927 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Response,. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Mayer Brown LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
May 1, 2013 Filing 927 RESPONSE re: (922 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Joseph Collins, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
April 25, 2013 Filing 926 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Madison Cary on behalf of Mayer Brown LLP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Cary, Robert)
April 21, 2013 Filing 925 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The defendants' motion for summary judgment should be denied. So Ordered (Signed by Special Master Daniel J. Capra on 4/21/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
April 18, 2013 Filing 924 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 1/30/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 18, 2013 Filing 923 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 1/30/2013 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 12, 2013 Filing 922 Objection re: (918 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1834 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 768 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Report and Recommendations - Special Master,,, /Plaintiffs' Objection to Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on the Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 921 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #95: Pursuant to Case Management Order #94, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in March 2013 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
April 10, 2013 Filing 920 RESPONSE re: (767 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 917 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1833 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) to Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 919 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #94: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters for the month of March, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today. i.e., by April 8, 2013. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the established account. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/1/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
March 27, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/27/2013. (Kotowski, Linda)
March 27, 2013 Filing 917 Objection re: (914 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 764 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1818 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Report and Recommendations - Special Master,,,,, /Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
March 25, 2013 Filing 918 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST THE MAYER BROWN DEFENDANTS re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1735 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 705 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. The Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment as to Collins and Mayer Brown should be denied. The Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment as to Koury must be denied. (Signed by Special Master on 3/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(tro) Modified on 4/3/2013 (tro).
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER in case 1:07-md-01902-JSR; finding as moot (517) Motion to Stay in case 1:08-cv-03086-JSR; Since nearly two years have elapsed and the relevantparties have resolved the discovery dispute between them, the Court hereby denies as moot the non-parties' motion to stay Special Master Hedges's Order regarding discovery disputes relating to Peter Ginsburg. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close document number 517 on the docket of this case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mt)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 915 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #93: Pursuant to Case Management Order #92, the time for objections to the bill of Special Master Capra for the month of February, 2013, and the bill of Special Master Hedges for the months of January and February, 2013, has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/13/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(lmb)
March 13, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/13/2013. (Kotowski, Linda)
March 11, 2013 Filing 914 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE PRIMARY VIOLATION OF FRAUD BY REFCO re: (709 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. In the absence of admissible evidence to establish their burden on this motion, the Plaintiffs are left with their assertion that there is no dispute about the Refco Fraud. But the Defendants do dispute almost all the Plaintiffs' contentions about the workings of the Refco Fraud, and so the Plaintiffs have not come close to establishing their burden for obtaining summary judgment on the primary violation of fraud by Refco. And a grant of summary judgment limited to the few facts that are beyond reasonable dispute will not advance the policies of convenience and efficiency that are embodied in Rule 56. The Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/28/2013. (Signed by Daniel J. Capra, Special Master on 3/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(lmb)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 913 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #92: The Court has received the bill from Special Master Capra for the month of February and the bill of Special Master Hedges for the months of January and February, both which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to either bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by March 11, 2013. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bill out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(djc)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 912 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #91: Pursuant to Case Management Order #90, the time for objections to the bill of Special Master for the month of January 2013 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any object to this bill, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay bill forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(cd)
February 8, 2013 Filing 911 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1735 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 705 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants.. Document filed by Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER: The Court finds itself in complete agreement with Special Master Capra's Report and Recommendation in all material respects and hereby adopts it in full as if incorporated herein. In addition, for reasons stated from the bench, the Court confirms its order striking, sua sponte, the proposed expert report of Professor I. Michael Greenberger in its entirety. See Tr. of Hearing, January 30, 2013 at 2-4. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/5/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ft)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 909 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #90: The Court has received the bill from Special Master Capra for the month of January, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to this bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by February 12, 2013. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bill out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/5/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(mro)
February 1, 2013 Filing 908 DECLARATION of Luke A. Connelly in Support re: (696 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1726 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 844 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count XVII., (701 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1731 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 849 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 207)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Connelly, Luke)
February 1, 2013 Filing 907 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (696 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1726 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 844 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count XVII., (701 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1731 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 849 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
February 1, 2013 Filing 906 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Mason C. Simpson in Support re: (1739 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 857 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 709 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 905 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1739 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 857 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 709 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco. /Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 904 RESPONSE re: (743 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 893 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1784 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Counter Statement to Rule 56.1, /Plaintiffs' Response to Mayer Brown LLP's and Paul Koury's Statement of Additional Material Facts. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 903 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1735 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 705 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants. /Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 902 RESPONSE re: (734 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 883 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1774 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Response to Motion, /Plaintiffs' Response to Joseph P. Collins' Statement of Additional Material Facts. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 901 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1735 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 705 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants. /Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Joseph Collins. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
January 30, 2013 Filing 900 DECLARATION of Lee M. Andelin in Opposition re: (696 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1726 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 844 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count XVII., (701 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1731 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 849 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-140)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
January 30, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 1/30/2013 re: #776 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Proposed Experts Michael Greenberger and David Wallace. filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. (Kotowski, Linda)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 899 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to Case Management Order #88, the time for objections to the bill of Special Master Hedges for the month of December 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to this bill, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bill forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 01/27/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(jcs)
January 28, 2013 Filing 898 EXHIBITS 1-140 (CD form) to Declaration of Lee M. Andelin in opposition to Moving Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment dated Jan. 22, 2013. (Accepted for filing by Special Master Ronald Hedges on 1/24/2013.)Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mro)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO FILE EXHIBITS BY DISK: Special Master Ronald J. Hedges, for good cause shown, hereby orders as follows: Plaintiffs may file the exhibits to their summary judgment opposition declaration on electronic disks at the Courthouse. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 1/24/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mro)
January 23, 2013 Filing 896 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Lee M. Andelin in Opposition re: (696 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1726 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 844 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count XVII., (701 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1731 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 849 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-140)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee) Modified on 2/15/2013 (db).
January 23, 2013 Filing 895 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
January 22, 2013 Filing 894 DECLARATION of Craig D. Singer in Opposition re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1735 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 705 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants.. Document filed by Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10, #2 Exhibits 11-14, #3 Exhibit 15, #4 Exhibits 16-21, #5 Exhibits 22-33)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
January 22, 2013 Filing 893 COUNTER STATEMENT TO (854 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 706 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1736 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Rule 56.1 Statement,,,,,,. Document filed by Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
January 22, 2013 Filing 892 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1735 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 705 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants. Memorandum of Law of Mayer Brown LLP and Paul Koury in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
January 22, 2013 Filing 891 DECLARATION of John S. Williams in Opposition re: (1739 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 857 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 709 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco.. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6 to Declaration)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
January 22, 2013 Filing 890 COUNTER STATEMENT TO (1740 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 710 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 858 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Rule 56.1 Statement,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
January 22, 2013 Filing 889 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (857 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco. The Mayer Brown Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Primary Violation. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
January 22, 2013 Filing 888 DECLARATION of Linda T. Coberly in Opposition re: (1739 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 857 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 709 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco.. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
January 22, 2013 Filing 887 COUNTER STATEMENT TO (1740 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 710 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 858 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Rule 56.1 Statement,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
January 22, 2013 Filing 886 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1739 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 857 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco.. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
January 22, 2013 Filing 885 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (844 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count XVII., (849 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
January 22, 2013 Filing 884 DECLARATION of Reed A. Smith in Opposition re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants.. Document filed by Joseph Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J to Declaration of Reed A. Smith, #2 Exhibit Exhibits K-O to Declaration of Reed A. Smith)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Schwartz, William)
January 22, 2013 Filing 883 RESPONSE to Motion re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants. Response of Joseph P. Collins in Opposition to Plaintiffs' 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Joseph Collins. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Schwartz, William)
January 22, 2013 Filing 882 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants.. Document filed by Joseph Collins. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Schwartz, William)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 881 STIPULATION AND ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING NEW LIAISON COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANTS' COORDINATING' COMMITTEE: that Luke A. Connelly, Esq. of the law firm Winston & Strawn LLP is hereby appointed and shall be DCC Liaison Counsel; 2. Philip D. Anker, Esq. of the law firm WilmerHale shall no longer hold the position of DCC Liaison Counsel and is hereby relieved of all duties associated with such position. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/14/13) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(pl)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 880 STIPULATION AND ORDER WITHDRAWING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OTHER MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Each of the Second Set of Summary Judgment Motions [In re Refco Inc. Securities Litig., 07 MD 1902, docket nos. 1718-1719] is hereby withdrawn as moot, without prejudice and subject to the terms set forth in the remainder of this Stipulation and Order (but, for the sake of clarity, the Omnibus Arguments shall continue to be litigated by Plaintiffs and other defendants that have not been dismissed from the Actions; and the Joint Memorandum of Law Addressing Common Issues in Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, the Joint Rule56.1 Statement in Support of Moving Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, and the Declaration of Luke A. Connelly in Support of Moving Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment [In re Refco Inc. Securities Litig., 07 MD 1902, docket nos. 1732-1734] are not withdrawn). (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/14/13) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(pl) Modified on 1/16/2013 (pl).
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 879 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #88: The Court has received the bill from Special Master Hedges for the month of December, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to this bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by January 17, 2013. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bill out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(mro)
December 28, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/28/2012. (Kotowski, Linda)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 878 JOINT STIPULATION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED, AND ADJUDGED, by and through Plaintiffs' and Mr. Best's respective counsel, that all claims asserted against Mr. Best in this action are dismissed with prejudice, with Plaintiffs and Mr. Best each bearing their own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses relating to the claims against Mr. Best. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(djc)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ORDER terminating (1577) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (1578) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (1579) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (1580) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (1581) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:07-md-01902-JSR; terminating (625) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (626) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (627) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:08-cv-03065-JSR; terminating (769) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (770) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (771) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (772) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:08-cv-03086-JSR; terminating (178) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:10-cv-03594-JSR. On October 17, 2012, Special Master Daniel J. Capra issued a Report and Recommendation recommending that the motions be granted with respect to the claims asserted by plaintiffs on behalf of PlusFunds and denied with respect to claims asserted on behalf of SPhynX Managed Future Funds ("SMFF"). As an alternative to his recommendation denying summary judgment as to the SMFFclaims, the Special Master also recommended that, should the Court reverse him on this issue, it should grant summary judgment to all moving defendants except Mayer Brown, Grant Thornton, and Ramler, for whom there remain issues of material fact sufficient to defeat summary judgment. On November 9, 2012, the plaintiffs and defendants timely filed their objections to the R&R, and, after further briefing, the Court heard oral argument on December 3, 2012. After full consideration of the parties' briefs and oral arguments, and having reviewed the entire matter de novo, the Court disagrees in part with the Special Master's Report and Recommendation and concludes, for reasons to be explained in a forthcoming written opinion, that the Special Master's recommendation-in-the alternative is the better view: the motions for summary judgment regarding SMFF claims should be granted to all moving defendants except Mayer Brown, Grant Thornton, and Ramler. That said, the Court does agree with the remainder of the Special Master's report, and thus agrees that all defendants are entitled to summary judgment as to those claims brought on behalf of PlusFunds. Final judgment as to the fully-dismissed defendants will not issue, however, until the Court issues its written opinion setting forth the reasons for this ruling. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/26/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(lmb)
December 21, 2012 Filing 876 EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF PHILIP D. ANKER IN SUPPORT OF THE BANKS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. VOLUME V of V. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(sac)
December 21, 2012 Filing 875 EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF PHILIP D. ANKER IN SUPPORT OF THE BANKS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. VOLUME IV of V. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(sac)
December 21, 2012 Filing 874 EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF PHILIP D. ANKER IN SUPPORT OF THE BANKS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. VOLUME III of V. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(sac)
December 21, 2012 Filing 873 EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF PHILIP D. ANKER IN SUPPORT OF THE BANKS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. VOLUME II of V. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(sac)
December 21, 2012 Filing 872 EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF PHILIP D. ANKER IN SUPPORT OF THE BANKS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. vOLUME I of V. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(sac)
December 20, 2012 Filing 869 RESPONSE re: (1713 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 829 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) Grant Thornton LLP and Mark Ramler's Response to Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation Striking Certain Opinions of Proposed Experts Michael Greenberger and David Wallace. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
December 20, 2012 Filing 868 DECLARATION of James J. Capra, Jr. re: (827 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1711 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 681 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Report and Recommendations - Special Master,,,, re RESPONSE OF PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLP TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION STRIKING EXPERT OPINIONS. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
December 20, 2012 Filing 867 RESPONSE re: (1711 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 827 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 681 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Report and Recommendations - Special Master,,,, .-RESPONSE OF PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLP TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION STRIKING EXPERT OPINIONS. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
December 18, 2012 Filing 866 EXHIBITS 1-206 (in CD Form) to the Declaration of Luke A. Connelly is Support of Moving Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Document Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by Special Master Ronald Hedges on 12/14/2012. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(mro)
December 18, 2012 Filing 865 EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF LUKE A. CONNELLY IN SUPPORT OF MOVING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT VOLUME 5 0F 5. ***Accepted for filing by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 12/14/2012. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(mro)
December 18, 2012 Filing 864 EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF LUKE A. CONNELLY IN SUPPORT OF MOVING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT VOLUME 4 0F 5. ***Accepted for filing by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 12/14/2012. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(mro)
December 18, 2012 Filing 863 EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF LUKE A. CONNELLY IN SUPPORT OF MOVING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT VOLUME 3 0F 5. ***Accepted for filing by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 12/14/2012. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(mro)
December 18, 2012 Filing 862 EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF LUKE A. CONNELLY IN SUPPORT OF MOVING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT VOLUME 2 0F 5. ***Accepted for filing by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 12/14/2012. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(mro)
December 18, 2012 Filing 861 EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF LUKE A. CONNELLY IN SUPPORT OF MOVING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT VOLUME 1 0F 5. ***Accepted for filing by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 12/14/2012. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(mro)
December 17, 2012 Filing 871 DECLARATION of Philip D. Anker in Support re: (218 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(rdz)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ORDER: GRANTING PERMISSION TO FILE HARD COPY [Defendants Exhibits to Rule 56.1]. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 12/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(rdz)
December 17, 2012 Filing 860 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Support re: (1739 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 857 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 709 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 225 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 3), #4 Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 3), #5 Exhibit 3 (Part 3 of 3), #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
December 17, 2012 Filing 859 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1739 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 225 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 857 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 709 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
December 17, 2012 Filing 858 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
December 17, 2012 Filing 857 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of the Primary Violation of Fraud by Refco. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
December 17, 2012 Filing 856 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Support re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1735 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 705 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 3), #3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 3), #4 Exhibit 2 (Part 3 of 3), #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
December 17, 2012 Filing 855 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (853 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1735 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 705 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
December 17, 2012 Filing 854 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
December 17, 2012 Filing 853 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Mayer Brown Defendants. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
December 17, 2012 Filing 852 DECLARATION of Luke A. Connelly in Support re: (218 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 688 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1718 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 836 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (837 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1719 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 689 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (696 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1726 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 844 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count XVII., (697 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 845 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1727 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment of Edward S. Best as to Count XVII., (701 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1731 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 849 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Joseph P Collins, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grant Thornton LLP, Mayer Brown LLP, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Mark Ramler, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Paul Koury, Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-206)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Connelly, Luke)
December 17, 2012 Filing 851 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Paul Koury, Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Grant Thornton LLP, Mayer Brown LLP, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
December 17, 2012 Filing 850 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (218 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 688 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1718 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 836 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (837 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1719 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 689 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (696 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1726 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 844 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count XVII., (697 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 845 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1727 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment of Edward S. Best as to Count XVII., (701 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1731 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 849 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc., Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
December 17, 2012 Filing 849 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Responses due by 1/21/2013Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
December 17, 2012 Filing 848 DECLARATION of John S. Williams in Support re: (845 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment of Edward S. Best as to Count XVII.. Document filed by Edward S. Best. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
December 17, 2012 Filing 847 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Edward S. Best. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
December 17, 2012 Filing 846 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (845 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment of Edward S. Best as to Count XVII. Unopposed Memorandum of Law of Edward S. Best in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Edward S. Best. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
December 17, 2012 Filing 845 MOTION for Summary Judgment Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment of Edward S. Best as to Count XVII. Document filed by Edward S. Best.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
December 17, 2012 Filing 844 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count XVII. Document filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
December 17, 2012 Filing 843 DECLARATION of James J. Capra, Jr. in Support re: (837 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 689 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1719 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30-Part1 of 2, #31 Exhibit 30-Part2 of 2, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35-Part1 of 2, #37 Exhibit 35-Part2 of 2, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
December 17, 2012 Filing 842 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Anker, Philip)
December 17, 2012 Filing 841 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
December 17, 2012 Filing 840 DECLARATION of Philip D. Anker in Support re: (218 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Anker, Philip)
December 17, 2012 Filing 839 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (837 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1719 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 689 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
December 17, 2012 Filing 838 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (218 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Anker, Philip)
December 17, 2012 Filing 837 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Responses due by 1/21/2013Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
December 17, 2012 Filing 836 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Anker, Philip)
December 14, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/14/2012. (Kotowski, Linda)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO FILE HARD COPY: SPECIAL MASTER RONALD J. HEDGES, for good cause shown, hereby orders as follows: The above-referenced defendants may file the exhibits to their Rule 56.1 statements on electronic disks, provided, however, that these exhibits be part of the public record and be so docketed by the clerk of the court. Defendants shall take all necessary steps, including conferring with the clerk, to ensure public docketing moreover, nothing shall be filed under sealed. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 12/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(ama)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 834 ORDER: H. Christopher Rose, former Chief Operating Officer of PlusFunds Group, Inc. ("PlusFunds"), testified as listed herein at his deposition on June 21, 2012 ("Rose Dep."). This Order shall not be considered final for purposes of appeal until the Special Master makes further rulings with respect to adverse inferences and preclusion sanctions, if any. Id at 94-95. (Signed by Special Master Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 12/13/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(ft) Modified on 12/17/2012 (ft).
December 12, 2012 Filing 833 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/3/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
December 12, 2012 Filing 832 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/3/2012 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 831 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #87: Pursuant to Case Management Order #86, the time for objections to the bill of Special Master Capra for the month of November 2012 and the bill from Special Master Hedges for the months of October and November 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(ago)
December 10, 2012 Filing 830 DECLARATION of Mason Simpson in Opposition re: (827 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1711 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 681 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Report and Recommendations - Special Master,,,,. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
December 10, 2012 Filing 829 Objection re: (827 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1711 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 681 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Report and Recommendations - Special Master,,,, /Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Motions to Strike Certain Opinions of Proposed Experts R. David Wallace and I. Michael Greenberger. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
December 3, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 12/3/2012 re: #770 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Edward S. Best, Mayer Brown LLP, #772 MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII). MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII). filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, #771 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler, #769 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Kotowski, Linda)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 828 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #86: The Court has received the bill from Special Master Capra for the month of November and the bill from Special Master Hedges for the months of October and November, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by December 7, 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/30/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(ft)
November 29, 2012 Filing 827 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON MOTIONS TO STRIKE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF PROPOSED EXPERTS R. DAVID WALLACE AND I. MICHAEL GREENBERGER: (Signed by Daniel J. Capra, Special Master on 11/29/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(pl) Modified on 1/4/2013 (pl).
November 27, 2012 Filing 826 RESPONSE re: (1699 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 821 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 672 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Objection to Report and Recommendations, /Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
November 27, 2012 Filing 825 RESPONSE re: (813 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Report and Recommendations,, (819 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) Response to Plaintiffs' Limited Objection. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Mark Ramler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John S. Williams and Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
November 27, 2012 Filing 824 RESPONSE re: (208 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1697 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 819 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 670 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) /RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS LIMITED OBJECTION. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Anker, Philip)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 823 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #85: Pursuant to Case Management Order #84, the time for objections to the bill of Special Master Capra for services rendered in October 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to this bill, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bill forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/16/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al. (djc)
November 14, 2012 Filing 822 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER: 1. In Krys v. Sugrue, No. 08-cv-3065 and Krys v. Deutsche Bank Securities, No. 10- cv-3594, any motions for summary judgment by any party shall be filed no later than December 17, 2012, with page limits of 65 pages for the brief in support of the common- issues motion by defendants PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP; Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated (as successor-by-merger to Bane of America Securities LLC); Grant Thornton LLP; Mark Ramler; Mayer Brown LLP; Joseph Collins; Edward S. Best; Paul Koury; and Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (collectively, the "Institutional Defendants") and 25 pages for any other brief in support of any other motion for summary judgment; 2. In Krys v. Sugrue, No. 08-cv-3065 and Krys v. Deutsche Bank Securities, No. 10- cv-3594, any oppositions to motions for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 21, 2013, with page limits of 65 pages for the opposition to the Institutional Defendants' common-issues motion and 25 pages for any opposition to any other motion; 3. In Krys v. Sugrue, No. 08-cv-3065 and Krys v. Deutsche Bank Securities, No. 10- cv-3594, any reply briefs supporting the motions for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 31, 2013, with page limits of 25 pages for the reply brief supporting the Institutional Defendants' common-issues motion and 15 pages for any reply brief supporting any other motion; 4. In Krys v. Aaron, No. 08-cv-7416, any motions for summary judgment by any party shall be filed no later than December 17, 2012, with page limits of 65 pages for the brief in support of the motion; any oppositions to motions for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 21, 2013, with page limits of 65 pages for the opposition; and any reply briefs supporting the motions for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 31, 2013, with page limits of 25 pages for the reply brief. 5. Oral argument on any motion described above shall be heard in the first instance by Special Master Capra, who will conduct oral argument no later than February 20, 2013. 6. Within two business days of the issuance of any Report and Recommendation by Special Master Capra, any party intending to object in whole or in part to the Report & Recommendation shall, with opposing counsel, contact Judge Rakoff's Chambers for a schedule to brief the objection. In that same call, the claims in the above-captioned actions (other than Krys v. Aaron, et al, No. 08-cv-7416) shall be set for trial at a date convenient to the Court after June 1, 2013. 7. Deadlines for motions in limine and pre-trial exchanges shall be negotiated by the parties in a manner consistent with the Court's Individual Practices. 8. Special Master Hedges shall conduct a telephonic conference call with regard to the status of all actions on March 12, 2013, at 3 PM Eastern time., ( Telephone Conference set for 3/12/2013 at 03:00 PM before Special Master Ronald J. Hedges.) (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges and Daniel J. Capra on 11/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(lmb)
November 9, 2012 Filing 821 OBJECTION to (664 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 813 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1681 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Report and Recommendations /LIMITED OBJECTION Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Anker, Philip)
November 9, 2012 Filing 820 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Support re: (208 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1697 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 819 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 670 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
November 9, 2012 Filing 819 Objection re: (664 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 204 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 813 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1681 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Report and Recommendations,, /Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Certain Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 818 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #84: The Court has received the bill from the Special Master Capra for the month of October, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to this bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by November 16, 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bill out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/09/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(ago)
November 8, 2012 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Electronic File). USCA Case Number 12-3586 . Certified Supplemental Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #809 Order, #806 Order, #816 MOTION for Thomas A. Gilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #810 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, filed by Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Edward S. Best, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Mark Ramler, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Mayer Brown LLP, #803 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler, #802 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, #800 Order,,, #813 Report and Recommendations,, #815 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,, #808 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis, #801 Order,, #805 Order, Add and Terminate Attorneys,, #807 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis, #812 Order, #797 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,,, filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Paul Koury, Joseph P Collins, Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Edward S. Best, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Mark Ramler, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Mayer Brown LLP, #799 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,, #814 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal,, #798 Rule 56.1 Statement,, filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc., Paul Koury, Joseph P Collins, Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Edward S. Best, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mark Ramler, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Mayer Brown LLP, #804 Order, #817 Order,,, #811 Order were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
November 8, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #816 MOTION for Thomas A. Gilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7962000.(Gilson, Thomas)
November 7, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 11/7/2012. (Kotowski, Linda)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER AMENDING JULY 28, 2012 MEMORANDUM ORDER: On July 28, 2012, the Court entered a Memorandum Order (the "Order"), dismissing all remaining claims against Ingram Micro, Inc., CIM Ventures, Inc., Liberty Corner Capital Strategies, LLC, and William T. Pigott and directing the Clerk to enter judgment with respect to them. To make express the Court's determination with respect to the direction of entry of judgment, the final paragraph of the Order is amended nunc pro tunc to add before the period at the end of the last sentence: in accordance with Rule 54(b), the Court having determined there is no just reason for delay. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(djc)
October 24, 2012 Filing 816 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF THOMAS A. GILSON. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(rjm)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 815 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF THOMAS A. GILSON. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Thomas A. Gilson is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for the Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. If this action is assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password at nysd.uscourts.gov. Counsel shall forward the check for the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court within one business day of the filing of this Order. (Signed by Special Master Ronald Hedges on 10/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(rjm) Modified on 10/25/2012 (rjm).
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 814 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL and ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the JOLs and the SPhinX Trustee, on the one hand, and Kavanagh and Owens on the other, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, that this action be dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party insofar as it related to Kavanagh and Owens. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/17/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ago)
October 17, 2012 Filing 813 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: The motion for summary judgment on claims brought on behalf of SMFF should be DENIED. The motion for summary judgment on claims brought on behalf of PlusFunds should be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 11/5/2012 (Signed by Special Master Daniel J. Capra on 10/17/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(ago) Modified on 10/17/2012 (tro).
October 17, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Objections to R&R due by 11/5/2012 (tro)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 812 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #83: Pursuant to Case Management Order #82, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in September 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(lmb)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 811 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 82: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters for the month of September, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by October 9, 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/02/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(ama)
September 24, 2012 Filing 810 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (185 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 185 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss for Spoliation of Evidence. MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence.. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Mark Ramler, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 809 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #81: that pursuant to Case Management Order #80, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in August 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/16/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(pl)
September 14, 2012 Filing 808 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Opposition re: (639 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 639 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 786 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 786 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 185 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 185 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1624 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1624 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss for Spoliation of Evidence. MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
September 14, 2012 Filing 807 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (639 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 639 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 786 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 786 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 185 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 185 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1624 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1624 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss for Spoliation of Evidence. MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence. /Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Other Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
September 12, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 9/12/2012. (Kotowski, Linda)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 806 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND ORDER: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Beth A. Tagliamonti is no longer associated with Winston & Strawn LLP and should be withdrawn as counsel of record on behalf of Defendants Grant Thornton LLP and Mark Ramler in the above-captioned actions. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:07-cv-08165-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jfe)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 805 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND ORDER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Calvin Kai-Xin Koo is no longer associated with Winston & Strawn LLP and should be withdrawn as counsel of record on behalf of Defendants Grant Thornton LLP and Mark Ramler in the above-captioned actions. Attorney Calvin Kai-Xin Koo terminated. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:07-cv-08165-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(rjm)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 804 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND ORDER: Ruth A. Braun is no longer associated with Winston & Strawn LLP and should be withdrawn as counsel of record on behalf of Defendants Grant Thornton LLP and Mark Ramler in the above-captioned actions. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:07-cv-08165-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jar)
September 7, 2012 Filing 803 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (776 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1587 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Strike Opinions of Proposed Experts Michael Greenberger and David Wallace.. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
September 7, 2012 Filing 802 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1589 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 778 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 631 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Strike EXPERT OPINIONS RELATING TO DISMISSED CLAIMS.. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 801 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #80: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters for the month of August, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, i.e., by September 11, 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/4/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(lmb)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ORDER ON SUPP./REBUTTAL REPORTS: IT IS on this 5th day of September 2012, ORDERED as follows:1. Plaintiffs' application for leave to serve any supplemental/rebuttal expert reports be and it hereby is denied without prejudice for the reasons set forth in the transcript of the hearing of August 31, 2012, a copy of which is attached. 2) After the conclusion of all expert discovery, presently scheduled to end on September 30, 2012, Plaintiffs may renew their request by filing an application, which shall include but not be limited to, copies of all existing reports and the deposition transcripts of these experts together with detailed reasons supporting the application for leave to serve any additional reports at that time. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 9/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(lmb)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR OTHER SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiffs Kenneth M. Krys, et al. shall file and serve any opposition to the Motion on or before September 14, 2012; and 2. The Moving Parties shall file and serve any reply in further support of the Motion on or before September 24, 2012; and 3. Oral argument on the Motion shall be held at 1:00 p.m. EDT on October 2, 2012 at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street New York, New York 10007., ( Responses due by 9/14/2012., Replies due by 9/24/2012.), ( Oral Argument set for 10/2/2012 at 01:00 PM before Special Master.) (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 9/4/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(lmb)
August 31, 2012 Filing 798 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc., Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Capra, James)
August 31, 2012 Filing 797 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (770 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1578 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 626 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (625 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1577 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 769 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (772 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 627 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1581 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII). MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII)., (1579 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 771 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (1580 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 178 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grant Thornton LLP, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Paul Koury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Capra, James)
August 31, 2012 Filing 796 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #768 Clerk's Judgment,,. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd.. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 0208-7779975. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Molton, David)
August 31, 2012 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #796 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
August 31, 2012 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #109 Certificate of Service Other, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #690 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, #646 Scheduling Order, #596 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) filed by 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., David V. Harkins, THL Managers V. LLC, Thomas H. Lee, Scott A. Schoen, Thomas H. Lee, Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners L.P., THL Equity Advisors V.L.P, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, David V. Harkings, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., #458 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,, #756 Notice of Change of Address filed by Bank of America Securities LLC, #725 Deposition filed by Christopher Aliprandi, #789 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis, #330 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #597 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,, filed by The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis, #385 Order, #246 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,, filed by Brian Owens, Mark Kavanagh, #613 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,, filed by The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis, #152 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Scott Kislin, Mitchell Karlan, Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, Beckenham Trading Co. Inc, #234 Certificate of Service Other,,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #25 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Collins, #373 Order, Add and Terminate Attorneys,,,,,,,,,, #591 Transcript,, #577 Declaration in Support of Motion,,, filed by 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., David V. Harkins, THL Managers V. LLC, Thomas H. Lee, Scott A. Schoen, Thomas H. Lee, Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, Thomas H. Lee Partners L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., THL Equity Advisors V.L.P, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, David V. Harkings, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., #207 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., David V. Harkins, THL Managers V. LLC, Scott A. Schoen, Thomas H. Lee, Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, Thomas H. Lee Partners L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., THL Equity Advisors V.L.P, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Scott L. Jaeckel, #521 Memorandum & Opinion,, #198 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Mari Ferris, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., #27 Affidavit of Service Other,,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #29 Affidavit of Service Other,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #305 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,, filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co., Bank of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, #299 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Banc of America Securities LLC, #723 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines,, #602 Response,,,,,,,, filed by The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis, #289 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines,,,, #630 Order,, #221 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Dennis Klejna, #724 Order,,,,, #739 Order, #720 Order,, #103 Affidavit of Service Other,,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #439 Order,,,,, #531 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) filed by The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis, #399 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #283 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, #593 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) filed by The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis, #409 Order, Add and Terminate Attorneys,,,,,, #104 Stipulation and Order,,, #519 Order, Set Deadlines,,,, #102 Affidavit of Service Other,,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #643 Declaration, Declaration in Support,,,,,, filed by Bank of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, #172 Notice of Appearance filed by EMF Financial Products LLC, Delta Flyer Fund LLC, Eric M. Flanagan, #730 Stipulation and Order,,, #608 MOTION for Certification of the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Refco Fraud Claims on Grounds of In Pari Delicto (Defendants' Notice of Motion). MOTION for Certification of the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Refco Fraud Claims on Grounds of In Pari Delicto (Defendants' Notice of Motion). filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co., Bank of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, #57 Affidavit of Service Other,,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #201 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler, #15 Notice of Appearance filed by Mayer Brown International LLP, #21 Order,, #8 Notice (Other) filed by Dennis Klejna, #51 Notice of Appearance filed by Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, #413 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) filed by Brian Owens, Mark Kavanagh, #359 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert C. Trosten, Robert Trosten, Robert C. Trosten, #276 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #715 Stipulation and Order,,, #671 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Brian Owens, #743 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Edward S. Best, Mayer Brown LLP, #366 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Banc of America Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., #99 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., David V. Harkins, THL Managers V. LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Scott A. Schoen, Bank of America Securities LLC, Mari Ferris, Grant Thornton LLP, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., THL Equity Advisors V.L.P, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Scott L. Jaeckel, Mark Ramler, Mayer Brown LLP, #780 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Phillip R. Bennett, #41 Declaration in Support of Motion,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #367 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #416 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) filed by 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., David V. Harkins, THL Managers V. LLC, Scott A. Schoen, Thomas H. Lee, Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, Thomas H. Lee Partners L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., THL Equity Advisors V.L.P, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, David V. Harkings, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., #450 Case Management Plan, #83 Affidavit of Service Other,,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #287 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Christopher Pettit, #166 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by CIM Ventures, Inc, Ingram Micro, Inc., #570 Report and Recommendations - Special Master,,,,,, #565 Memorandum of Law, filed by Brian Owens, Mark Kavanagh, #363 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #185 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Christopher Pettit, #461 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #544 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Thomas Hackl. filed by The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, Margot Macinnis, #10 Notice of Appearance,, filed by Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #364 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, James P. Sinclair, Christopher Stride, #618 MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086
August 28, 2012 Filing 795 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Opposition re: (778 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 631 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1589 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Strike EXPERT OPINIONS RELATING TO DISMISSED CLAIMS.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 28, 2012 Filing 794 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (1589 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 778 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 631 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Strike EXPERT OPINIONS RELATING TO DISMISSED CLAIMS.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 28, 2012 Filing 793 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Opposition re: (776 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1587 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Strike Opinions of Proposed Experts Michael Greenberger and David Wallace.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 28, 2012 Filing 792 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (776 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1587 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Strike Opinions of Proposed Experts Michael Greenberger and David Wallace.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
August 23, 2012 Filing 791 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Opposition re: (770 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1578 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 626 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (625 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1577 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 769 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (772 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 627 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1581 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII). MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII)., (1579 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 771 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (1580 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 178 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
August 23, 2012 Filing 790 COUNTER STATEMENT TO (774 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 629 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1583 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 180 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR) Rule 56.1 Statement,,. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
August 23, 2012 Filing 789 DECLARATION of Kenneth Krys in Opposition re: (1577 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 625 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 769 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (178 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1580 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (770 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1578 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 626 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (772 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1581 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 627 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII). MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII)., (1579 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 771 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
August 23, 2012 Filing 788 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1577 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 625 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 769 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (178 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1580 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (770 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1578 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 626 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (772 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1581 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 627 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII). MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII)., (1579 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 771 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment. /Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Moving Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Molton, David)
August 21, 2012 Filing 787 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (185 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 185 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss for Spoliation of Evidence. MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence.. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Paul Koury, Joseph P Collins, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grant Thornton LLP, Mayer Brown LLP, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Mark Ramler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 21, 2012 Filing 786 MOTION to Dismiss for Spoliation of Evidence., MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Paul Koury, Joseph P Collins, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Grant Thornton LLP, Mayer Brown LLP, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Mark Ramler.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION OF SUGRUE ACTIONS IN MANNER MOST APPROPRIATE TO CLERK'S ADMINISTRATION OF MDL PROCEEDING: It is hereby ORDERED that the Sugrue Actions shall be consolidated in a manner most appropriate to the Clerk's administration of the MDL proceeding. (Signed by Ronald J. Hedges, Special Master on 8/17/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(lmb)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION OF SUGRUE ACTION FOR ALL PURPOSES: It is hereby Ordered that the Sugrue action shall be consolidated for all purposes. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 8/16/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jfe)
August 16, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:07-md-01902-JSR.. (jfe)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 783 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #79: Pursuant to Case Management Order #78, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in July 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/13/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(djc)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR SERVING EXPERT REPORTS: SPECIAL MASTER RONALD J. HEDGES, for good cause shown, hereby orders as follows: 1. The deadline for the above-referenced defendants to serve one of their expert reports shall be extended until August 17, 2012; 2. The deadline for the Plaintiffs to seek leave to serve any rebuttal to that report shall be extended until August 23, 2012. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 8/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(djc)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR SERVING EXPERT REPORTS LIMITED PURPOSE: SPECIAL MASTER RONALD J. HEDGES, for good cause shown, hereby orders as follows: 1. The deadline for the DPM Defendants and Aaron to serve two of their expert reports shall be extended until August 31, 2012; 2. The deadline for the DPM Defendants and Aaron to serve any additional expert reports shall be extended until September 14, 2012. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 8/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR(djc)
August 7, 2012 Filing 780 DECLARATION of James J. Capra, Jr. in Support re: (1589 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 778 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 631 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Strike EXPERT OPINIONS RELATING TO DISMISSED CLAIMS.. Document filed by Phillip R. Bennett, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
August 7, 2012 Filing 779 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1589 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 778 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 631 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION to Strike EXPERT OPINIONS RELATING TO DISMISSED CLAIMS.. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:05-cv-08988-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
August 7, 2012 Filing 778 MOTION to Strike EXPERT OPINIONS RELATING TO DISMISSED CLAIMS. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Responses due by 8/24/2012Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
August 7, 2012 Filing 777 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (776 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1587 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Strike Opinions of Proposed Experts Michael Greenberger and David Wallace.. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 7, 2012 Filing 776 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Proposed Experts Michael Greenberger and David Wallace. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 2, 2012 Filing 775 DECLARATION of James J. Capra, Jr. in Support re: (770 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1578 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 626 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (625 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1577 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 769 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (772 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 627 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1581 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII). MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII)., (1579 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 771 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (1580 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 178 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc., Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Paul Koury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Capra, James)
August 2, 2012 Filing 774 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc., Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Capra, James)
August 2, 2012 Filing 773 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1577 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 625 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 769 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (178 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1580 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (770 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1578 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 626 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (772 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1581 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 627 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII). MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII)., (1579 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 771 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Grant Thornton LLP, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP, Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc., Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Mark Ramler, Joseph P Collins, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Paul Koury. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(Capra, James)
August 2, 2012 Filing 772 MOTION for Summary Judgment for an order dismissing the remaining count of the Amended Complaint directed at PwC (Count XVII). Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Responses due by 8/23/2012Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
August 2, 2012 Filing 771 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Coberly, Linda)
August 2, 2012 Filing 770 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Joseph Collins, Paul Koury, Mayer Brown LLP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
August 2, 2012 Filing 769 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Anker, Philip)
July 31, 2012 Filing 768 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Order dated July 28, 2012, the Court finds itself in agreement with Special Master Capra's Report and Recommendation; accordingly, the Court, reaffirms its own "bottom line" Order of July 17, 2012, dismissing, with prejudice, plaintiffs claims of aiding and abetting fraud against Ingram Micro, Inc., CIM Ventures, Inc., Liberty Corner Capital Strategies LLC, and William T. Pigott. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/31/12) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ml)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 767 STIPULATION AND ORDER: that the time within which Trosten may answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is extended to and including September 18, 2012. Robert C. Trosten answer due 9/18/2012; Robert Trosten answer due 9/18/2012. (Signed by Special Master, Ronald J. Hedges on 7/31/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ja)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 766 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #192 Motion to Dismiss. This Memorandum sets forth the Court's reasoning for that ruling, and directs the entry of final judgment. In all other respects but those noted in this Order, the Court finds itself in agreement with Special Master Capra's Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, the Court, reaffirming its own "bottom line" Order of July 17, 2012, dismisses, with prejudice, plaintiffs' claims of aiding and abetting fraud against Ingram Micro, Inc., CIM Ventures, Inc., Liberty Corner Capital Strategies LLC, and William T. Pigott, and directs the Clerk to enter judgment to this effect. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/28/2012) (pl)
July 30, 2012 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #766 Order on Motion to Dismiss, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (pl)
July 27, 2012 Filing 765 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER EXTENDING FACT DEPOSITION DEADLINE FOR LIMITED PURPOSE: SPECIAL MASTER RONALD J. HEDGES, for good cause shown, hereby orders as follows: 1. The fact deposition deadline shall be extended beyond July 31, 2012, for the limited purpose of completing the deposition of Walkers. 2. This Order shall have no effect on any prior orders entered concerning the Scheduling Order. (Signed by Ronald J. Hedges, Special Master on 7/26/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(lmb)
July 24, 2012 Filing 764 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/14/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 24, 2012 Filing 763 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 3/14/2012 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER: On February 10, 2012, Special Master Daniel J. Capra issued a Report and Recommendation in the above-captioned cases recommending that the Court grant the motions to dismiss of defendants Ingram Micro, Inc. and its subsidiary CIM Ventures, Inc. (collectively "the Ingram Defendants") and Liberty Corner Capital Strategies LLC and William T. Pigott, the sole owner of Liberty Corner (collectively "the Liberty Corner Defendants"). After the plaintiffs timely submitted their objections to the report and recommendation and defendants responded thereto, the Court considered the entire matter de novo. Having done so, and for reasons that will be explained in a forthcoming written opinion, the Court finds itself in agreement with the Special Master's conclusion that plaintiffs' claims against defendants should be dismissed, with prejudice. Final judgment, however, will not issue until the Court issues its written opinion giving the reasons for this ruling. Meanwhile, all further discovery and proceedings related to these defendants are hereby stayed. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/17/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(djc)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 761 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #77: Pursuant to Case Management Order #76, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in June 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(jfe)
July 12, 2012 Filing 760 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeremy S. Winer on behalf of Bank of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co.. New Address: Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, 7 World Trade Center, New York, New York, USA 10007, 212-230-8800. (Winer, Jeremy)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN EXPERT DEADLINES: Special Master Ronald J. Hedges, hereby orders as follows: 1. Defendants Kavanagh and Owens may serve expert reports by October 15, 2012. 2. Plaintiffs shall have until October 31, 2012 to depose any expert identified in any expert reports served by defendants Kavanagh and Owens. ( Deposition due by 10/31/2012.) (Signed by Special Master on 7/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js) Modified on 7/13/2012 (js).
July 11, 2012 Filing 758 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Peter J. Macdonald on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co.. New Address: Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, 7 World Trade Center, New York, New York, USA 10007, 212-230-8800. (Macdonald, Peter)
July 10, 2012 Filing 757 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Philip David Anker on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc.. New Address: 7 World Trade Center, New York, NY, 10007,. (Anker, Philip)
July 10, 2012 Filing 756 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ross Eric Firsenbaum on behalf of Bank of America Securities LLC. New Address: Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, 7 World Trade Center, New York, New York, USA 10007, 212-230-8800. (Firsenbaum, Ross)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 755 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #76: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters for the month of June, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, on June 9, 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/2/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(pl)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 754 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between plaintiffs Kenneth Krys, et al. and defendant Robert Trosten, through their undersigned counsel, in the above-captioned actions, Krys, et al. v. Sugrue, et al., Nos. 08-cv-3065 (JSR), 08-cv-3086 (JSR) that the time within which Trosten may answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is extended to and including July 18, 2012., Robert C. Trosten answer due 7/18/2012. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 6/21/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(lmb)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 753 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #75: Pursuant to Case Management Order #74, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in May 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/21/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(pl)
June 13, 2012 Filing 752 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOVING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY: It is hereby ORDERED that the request for international judicial assistance pursuant to the Moving Defendants' Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, filed on June 1, 2012, and joined by the Aaron and DPM defendants in the Krys v. Aaron action, GRANTED. The Clerk of this Court shall issue under the Court's seal the signed letters rogatory attached to this order, and transmit the signed, sealed letters rogatory to Jeremy S. Winer, Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, 399 Park Avenue, New York, New York 10022, counsel for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (as successor by merger to Bane of America Securities LLC) and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Signed by Special Master Ronald Hedges on 6/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:05-cv-09327-GEL, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR(jfe)
June 11, 2012 Filing 751 NOTICE of STATEMENT NOTING DEATH OF DEFENDANT MARI FERRIS. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER. The parties having represented to Special Master Ronald J. Hedges and the Court that certain actions in this MDL have been fully disposed of - either by settlement or by order of the Court - and can therefore be terminated, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to close the following cases: Mazur v. Refco, Inc., 05 Civ. 8626. Am. Fin. Int'l Group-Asia, L.L.C. v. Refco, Inc., 05 Civ. 8988. VR Global Partners L.P. v. Bennett, 07 Civ. 8686. Capital Mgmt. Select Fund Ltd. v. Bennett, 07 Civ. 8688. The Court grants leave to any party to move within 30 days from the date hereof to reopen their case if a live claim exists. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al. (rjm)
June 6, 2012 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (1502 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 749 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 336 in 1:08-cv-07416-JSR) Order,,,, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR(jfe)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER GRANTING MOVING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY: It is hereby ORDERED that the request for international judicial assistance pursuant to the Moving Defendants' Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, filed on June 1, 2012, and joined by the Aaron and DPM defendants in the Krys v. Aaron action, GRANTED. The Clerk of this Court shall issue under the Court's seal the signed letters rogatory attached to this order, and transmit the signed, sealed letters rogatory to Jeremy S. Winer, Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, 399 Park A venue, New York, New York 10022, counsel for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (as successor by merger to Bane of America Securities LLC) and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 6/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR(jfe)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 748 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #74: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters for the month of May, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, on June 11, 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/4/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(mro)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 747 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/1/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR(mro)
May 24, 2012 Filing 746 ANSWER to 134 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler.(Cuneo, Lauren)
May 24, 2012 Filing 745 ANSWER to 134 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Bank of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merril Lynch, Pierce Fennner & Smith, Inc..(Anker, Philip)
May 24, 2012 Filing 744 ANSWER to 134 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Joseph Collins.(Bach, Jonathan)
May 24, 2012 Filing 743 ANSWER to 134 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Mayer Brown LLP.(Ward, Thomas)
May 24, 2012 Filing 742 ANSWER to 134 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Paul Koury.(Clayman, Charles)
May 24, 2012 Filing 741 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTIONS proceeding held on 2/28/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 24, 2012 Filing 740 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTIONS held on 2/28/2012 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/18/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 739 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 73. Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 72, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in April 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/17/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(rjm)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 738 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Accordingly, the Court concludes that the Krys action cannot be grouped with the Private Actions Trust action for SLUSA purposes.Defendants also argue that the Krys action can be grouped with various actions in this MDL that have either settled or been dismissed with prejudice, such as the now-settled securities class action filed against Refco. 6 See Def. Obj. at11-12. SLUSA'S grouping provision however, allows the Court to group this action with cases that are "filed in or pending in the same court." 78bb(f) (5) (B) (ii). These settled and dismissed cases are no longer "pending" in this Court, nor were they originally "filed" in the same court as the Krys plaintiffs. Congress' clear use of the present tense for "pending" cases and past tense for "filed" cases forecloses defendants argument. Accordingly, the Court declines to group the Krys action with any of the other now-settled or dismissed actions in the Refco MDL.The Court therefore reaches the same ultimate conclusion as Special Master Capra: the Krys plaintiffs t claims are not barred by SLUSA. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/09/2012) (ama)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY AND PROPOSED ORDER: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Robert Lee Boone is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record in the above-captioned matters for defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (as successor by merger to Bane of America Securities LLC). Mr. Boone is no longer affiliated with the law finn Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, and will no longer have any association with the above-captioned matters. Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP will continue ascounsel for the above-referenced matters. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/8/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(rdz)
May 8, 2012 Filing 736 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #72: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters for the month of April, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, on May 14, 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(cd)
May 2, 2012 Filing 735 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/14/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 2, 2012 Filing 734 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 3/14/2012 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 2, 2012 Filing 733 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/17/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 2, 2012 Filing 732 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNCE held on 2/17/2012 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 731 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between plaintiffs Kenneth M. Krys, et al. and defendant Robert Trosten, though their undersigned counsel, in the above-captioned actions, Krys, et al. v. Sugrue, et al., Nos. 08-cv-3065 (JSR), 08-cv-3086 (JSR), that the time within which Trosten may answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is extended to and including June 18, 2012. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 5/1/2012) (mro)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 730 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH CERTAIN DEFENDANTS MAY ANSWER COMPLAINTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Defendants Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (as successor by merger to Banc of America Securities LLC), Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. and Plaintiffs in the above-referenced Krys actions, by and through their undersigned counsel, that the time within which Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (as successor by merger to Banc of America Securities LLC) and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC may answer the First Amended Complaint in 08-CIV-3086, and the time within which Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. may answer the Complaint in 10-CIV-3594, are hereby extended through and including May 24, 2012. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 5/1/2012) (mro)
May 1, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC answer due 5/24/2012. (mro)
May 1, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Robert C. Trosten answer due 6/18/2012. (mro)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 729 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #71: Pursuant to Case Management Order #70, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in March 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/13/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(lmb)
April 13, 2012 Filing 728 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Luke A. Connelly on behalf of Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Connelly, Luke)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 727 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH GRANT THORNTON LLP AND MARK RAMLER MAY ANSWER THE AMENDED COMPLAINT: It is hereby Stipulated and agreed that the time within which defendants may answer the Amended Complaint is hereby extended through and including 6/1/12. Grant Thornton LLP answer due 6/1/2012; Mark Ramler answer due 6/1/2012. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 4/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jfe)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: Mr. Karlan shall be deposed on April 5, 2012 for no more than one day of seven hours, unless otherwise stipulated or directed by the court. Plaintiffs reserve their rights to seek additional time to question Mr. Karlan. Plaintiffs shall deliver a set of the unredacted documents subject to the December 2010 Protective Order to Special Master Hedges three business days before the date of the deposition. Plaintiffs shall bring a set of the unredacted documents subject to the December 2010 Protective Order to the deposition. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 4/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:11-cv-01486-JSR(jfe) Modified on 4/13/2012 (jfe).
April 11, 2012 Filing 725 DEPOSITION.Document filed by Christopher Aliprandi.Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1:11-cv-01486-JSR(McDonough, Theodore)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 724 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER: Accordingly, the Court issues this supplemental Order to clarify the original Order. The Court agrees with defendants that, on the face of the present complaint, plaintiffs have not plausibly alleged that Ramler's work on Refco's financial statements when he worked at Arthur Andersen is connected to the Refco fraud in any way. Nonetheless, it may still be possible for plaintiffs to amend their complaint to allege plausibly that Ramler substantially assisted the Refco fraud earlier than the current allegations against him (and Grant Thornton) suggest. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) (2); see Foman v. Davis, 371 U.S. 178, 182 (1962) (explaining policy of allowing liberal amendments). With these clarifications, the Court reaffirms its original Order: if plaintiffs believe they can plausibly allege such a theory, they are hereby directed to present their argument to amend the complaint to the Special Master as further set forth in this order. See Arnold v. KPMG LLP, 334 F. App'x 349, 352 (2d Cir. 2009) (summary order) (noting plaintiff must demonstrate he can amend complaint in manner that would survive dismissal). (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(lmb)
April 5, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC answer due 5/24/2012; Grant Thornton LLP answer due 5/24/2012; Thomas H. Lee answer due 5/24/2012; Mark Ramler answer due 5/24/2012. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 723 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between plaintiffs Kenneth M. Krys, et al. and defendant Robert Trosten, though their undersigned counsel, in the above captioned actions, Krys, et al. v. Sugrue, et al., Nos. 08-cv-3065 (JSR), 08-cv-3086 (JSR), that the time within which Trosten may answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is extended to and including April30, 2012. (Signed by Special Master on 4/5/2012) (js)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 722 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANTS MAY ANSWER COMPLAINT:: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Defendants Mayer Brown LLP, Edwards. Best, Joseph P. Collins, Paul Koury, and Plaintiffs in the above referenced Krys action, by and through their undersigned counsel, that the time within which Defendants may answer the First Amended Complaint in 08-CIV -3086, is hereby extended through and including May 24, 2012. (Signed by Special Master on 4/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(js)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 721 STIPULATION AND ORDER: By and between plaintiffs Kenneth M. Krys, et al. and defendant Robert Trosten, through their undersigned counsel, in the above-captioned actions, that the time within which Trosten may answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is extended to and including April 30, 2012. (Signed by Special Master Hon. Ronald J. Hedges on 4/5/2012) (rdz) Modified on 4/5/2012 (rdz).
April 5, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Robert C. Trosten answer due 4/30/2012. (rdz)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 720 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #70: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters for the month of March, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, on April 9, 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/2/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(ft)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: On December 16, 2011, Special Master Daniel J. Capra issued a Report and Recommendation in the above captioned case recommending that the motion to dismiss brought by defendants Grant Thornton LLP and Mark Ramler be granted in part and denied in part. After the parties timely submitted their objections and responded thereto, the Court heard oral argument on February 17, 2012 and considered the entire for entire matter de novo. Having done so, the Court finds itself in agreement with Special Master Capra's Report and Recommendation in all material respects and hereby adopts it in full as if incorporated herein. Additionally, plaintiffs' seek leave from this Court to amend their complaint. This request is not addressed in the Special Master's Report and Recommendation, as it was not presented to him. Accordingly, plaintiffs are directed to present this argument to special Master Capra, who will decide the issue in the first instance. (538 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 644 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1343 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Report and Recommendations,,, (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/26/2012) (js)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 718 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to Case Management order #68, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in February 2012 has elapsed. Since the court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (1361 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 548 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 661 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR): the Court finds itself in agreement with Special Master Capra's Report and Recommendation in all material respects and hereby adopts it in full as if incorporated herein and the Mayer Brown Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs' claims be granted in part and denied in part. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/24/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(cd)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER: Third-party defendant Patrina Khoo Farquharson shall promptly create an index of the electronic documents requested for production by Defendants Mark Kavanagh and Brian Owens and the DPM Defendants, and as further set forth in this document. ( Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2012 at 03:00 PM before Special Master Ronald J. Hedges) (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 3/26/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1:11-cv-01486-JSR(cd)
March 22, 2012 Filing 714 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a argument proceeding held on 3/14/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2012 Filing 713 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Argument held on 3/14/2012 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 21, 2012 Filing 715 STIPULATED ORDER: Mr. Aliprandi, Mr. Aaronson, and Mr. McMahon still contend that the Documents are privileged but nonetheless desire to end the instant dispute, and thus agree to produce the Documents to the DPM Parties within two (2) business days of issuance of this Stipulated Order, without waiver of any privilege, attorney-client or attorney work product or otherwise, that Mr. Aliprandi, Mr. Aaronson, and Mr. McMahon would be otherwise entitled to assert with respect to any other documents, communications and information. This Stipulated Order is issued in accordance with Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). (Signed by Special Master Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 3/21/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1:11-cv-01486-JSR(ft)
March 21, 2012 Filing 712 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT: On December 30, 2011, the Case Accountant, Ball Baker Leake, LLP, submitted to the Special Master a bill for services rendered in this MDL from September 19, 2011 to December 30, 2011 in the amount of $1,369.47. The Special Master through liaison counsel, informed the Plaintiffs' Coordinating Committee and the Defendants' Coordinating Committee to submit objections, if any, to the Case Accountant's bill on or before January 6, 2012. Having received no objections, the Special Master hereby orders that the Case Accountant shall pay itself a total of $1,369.47 from the escrow account in this MDL, with half of that amount ($684.74) attributed to the Plaintiffs' Coordinating Committee and the other half to the Defendants' Coordinating Committee. (Signed by Ronald Hedges, Special Master on 1/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(lmb)
March 20, 2012 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #712 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DENNIS BLACKHURST. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jfe)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 711 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANTS MAY ANSWER COMPLAINTS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the time within which Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (as successor by merger to Bane of America Securities LLC) and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC may answer the First Amended Complaint in 08-CIV-3086, and the time within which Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. may answer the Complaint in 10-CIV-3594, are hereby extended through and including April 30, 2012. (Signed by Special Master on 3/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(jfe)
March 15, 2012 Filing 710 STIPULATED ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Mr. Rose withdraws his assertion of attorney-client privilege and work product with respect to the Schedule A Documents; 2. The parties to the Actions shall use the Schedule A Documents only for purposes of Refco-related litigation; and 3. No party shall contend that, by the act of agreeing to this Stipulated Order, Mr. Rose waived any attorney-client privilege or any other applicable privileges that otherwise may exist with respect to the Schedule A Documents. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 3/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1:11-cv-01486-JSR(rjm)
March 15, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC answer due 4/30/2012. (jfe)
March 8, 2012 Filing 709 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated March 8, 2012, the report is adopted in its entirety, and default judgment is entered against defendant Thomas Hackl. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/8/12) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(dt)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER adopting (557 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1206 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 469 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Report and Recommendations - Special Master; granting (1188 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 460 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 544 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Motion for Default Judgment filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. On July 19, 2011, Special Master Ronald J. Hedges issued a Report and Recommendation in the above-captioned case recommending that default judgment be entered against defendant Thomas Hackl. Defendant Hackl has failed to file any objections to the Report and Recommendation. See Case Management Order No. 3, dated Nov. 2, 2009. Accordingly, the Court hereby adopts the Special Master's Report and Recommendation in its entirety as if incorporated herein and directs that default judgment be entered against defendant Hackl. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close document 1188 on the docket sheet of 07 MDL 1902, document 460 on the docket sheet of 08 civ. 3065, and document 544 on the docket sheet of 08 Civ. 3086. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mro)
March 8, 2012 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (708 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 587 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1415 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mro)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 706 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #68: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters for the month of February, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, on March 12, 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(js)
March 2, 2012 Filing 705 DECLARATION of Robert F. Wise, Jr. in Support of Ingram Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Ingram Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by CIM Ventures, Inc, Ingram Micro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wise, Robert)
March 2, 2012 Filing 704 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON INGRAM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Document filed by CIM Ventures, Inc, Ingram Micro, Inc.. (Wise, Robert)
March 2, 2012 Filing 703 DECLARATION of Kevin H. Marino in Opposition re: (1400 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Liberty Corner Capital Strategies, LLC, William T. Pigott, William T. Pigott. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Tortorella, John)
March 2, 2012 Filing 702 RESPONSE re: (1400 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Liberty Corner Capital Strategies, LLC, William T. Pigott, William T. Pigott. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Tortorella, John)
February 29, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 2/29/2012 re: #676 Objection to Report and Recommendations, filed by Edward S. Best, Mayer Brown LLP, #677 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. (Landers, Rigoberto)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 707 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANTS MAY ANSWER COMPLAINTS: The time within which Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (as successor by merger to Bane of America Securities LLC) and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC may answer the First Amended Complaint in 08-CIV -3086, and the time within which Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. may answer the Complaint in 10-CIV-3594, are hereby extended through and including April 30, 2012. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 2/29/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR (ab) Modified on 3/5/2012 (ab).
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 701 MEMORANDUM ORDER. The Court adopts Special Master Hedges's ruling in full and reaffirms its February 15, 2012 ruling. Mr. Winegardner must answer the questions about his conversations with the Krys plaintiffs' attorneys, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(rjm)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 700 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #67: Pursuant to Case Management Order #66, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in January 2012 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/21/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mro)
February 21, 2012 Filing 699 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Opposition re: (686 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1387 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 570 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Report and Recommendations,. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
February 21, 2012 Filing 698 Objection re: (686 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1387 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 570 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Report and Recommendations, /SPhinX Plaintiffs' Objection to Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Motions to Dismiss Brought by the Ingram Defendants and the Liberty Corner Defendants. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
February 21, 2012 Filing 697 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/14/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 21, 2012 Filing 696 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 12/14/2011 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 21, 2012 Filing 695 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/14/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 21, 2012 Filing 694 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 12/14/2011 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 17, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 2/17/2012 re: #618 MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme filed by Kenneth M Krys, Kenneth M. Krys, The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Margot Macinnis. (Landers, Rigoberto)
February 17, 2012 Filing 693 CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated February 14, 2012, the report is adopted in its entirety, and default judgment is entered against defendants Sugrue, Bennett, and RGHI. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/17/12) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ml)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 692 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Accordingly, plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of this Court's Order adopting the SpecialMaster's Report and Recommendation is hereby denied in all respects.The Clerk of the Court is directed to close document number 1293 onthe docket sheet of 07 MDL 1902, document number 517 on the docket sheet of 08 Civ. 3065, and document number 618 on the docket sheet of08 Civ. 3086. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/16/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ama)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER: After the parties timely submitted their objections and responded thereto, the Court heard oral argument on January 24, 2012 and considered the entire matter de Novo. Having done so, the Court finds itself in agreement with Special Master Capra's Report and Recommendation in all material respects and hereby adopts it in full as if incorporated herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/16/2017) (ama)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORDER: Accordingly, on September 6, 2011, Special Master Hedges issued a revised Report and Recommendation on plaintiffs' motion for default judgment recommending that default judgment be entered as to all three defendants named in plaintiffs' moving papers. Defendants have failed to file any objections to either the original or revised Report and Recommendation. See Case Management Order No.3, dated Nov. 2, 2009. Accordingly, the court hereby adopts the Special Master's revised Report and Recommendation in its entirety as if incorporated herein and directs that default judgment be entered against defendants Sugrue, Bennett, and RGHI. Clerk to enter judgment. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jfe)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ORDER: for (1311 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 627 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 526 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Report and Recommendations. On November 27, 2011, Special Master Daniel J. Capra issued a Report and Recommendation in the above captioned case recommending that the THL Defendants,l motion to dismiss plaintiffs' claims be granted in its entirety. After the parties timely submitted their objections and responded thereto, the Court heard oral argument on January 24, 2012 and considered the entire matter de novo. Having done so, the Court finds itself in agreement with Special Master Capra's Report and Recommendation in all material respects and hereby adopts it in full as if incorporated herein. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jfe)
February 16, 2012 Filing 688 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Argument proceeding held on 1/24/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 16, 2012 Filing 687 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Argument held on 1/24/2012 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 16, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #685 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, in the amount of $400.00, paid on 02/09/2012, Receipt Number 1029285,1029289. (jd)
February 16, 2012 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (690 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 572 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1389 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,,,, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jfe)
February 10, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/10/2012. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(mro)
February 10, 2012 Filing 686 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS BROUGHT BY THE INGRAM DEFENDANTS AND THE LIBERTY CORNER DEFENDANTS: The claims against the Ingram Defendants and the Liberty Corner Defendants in Counts XXIII and XXIV should be dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Special Master Daniel J. Capra on 2/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(ft)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 685 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SCOT C. STIRLING BRITTON M. WORTHEN: Britton M. Worthen and Scot C. Stirling are admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for the Plaintiff in these cases in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Attorney Scot Christopher Stirling for Kenneth M. Krys,Scot Christopher Stirling for Kenneth M. Krys,Scot Christopher Stirling for Kenneth M. Krys,Scot Christopher Stirling for Kenneth M. Krys admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Special Master Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 2/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al. (ft)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER: Notwithstanding any provisions to the contrary in the Protective Order of December 15, 2009, the Gibson Dunn Parties and the Krys Plaintiffs shall be permitted to access and use any documents produced by any party in the Krys Actions, including documents constituting or containing Confidential Discovery Material, in the Arbitration, except for documents produced by the PwC Defendants and the THL Defendants. Counsel for the Gibson Dunn Parties at Gregory P. Joseph Law Offices LLC may have access to, and use, any documents, including documents constituting or containing Confidential Discovery Material, that are presented to witnesses in the course of the depositions they are defending in the Krys Actions, specifically including the depositions of Scott A. Kislin, Mitchell A. Karlan, Bruce Bolander and M. Natasha Labovitz. Any other counsel representing those witnesses or any other Gibson Dunn witnesses in connection with their depositions also may have access to, and use, any documents that are presented to the witnesses in the course of the depositions. The use of such Confidential Discovery Material by counsel identified in Paragraphs 1 and 2 shall only be in connection with the Krys Actions and the Arbitration and for no other purpose. The Protective Order of December 15, 2009 shall remain fully applicable to all Confidential Discovery Material unless expressly provided otherwise herein. (Signed by Special Master Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 2/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(ft)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER AMENDING SPECIAL MASTER ORDER RELATED TO NOVEMBER 9, 2011 CONFERENCE: The deadline for Plaintiffs to serve their list of potential trial exhibits as required by paragraph 9 of the Special Master Order Related to November 9, 2011 Conference (the "Exhibits List") shall be and is extended for 30 days from the current deadline of January 30, 2012; provided, however, Plaintiffs shall serve by January 30, 2012 a preliminary list of all such exhibits they have identified to date, which preliminary list shall constitute at least a "substantial portion" of the final version of the Exhibits List; provided, further, if any witness noticed by the Defendants is deposed before Plaintiffs provide their final version of the Exhibits List, Defendants reserve all rights to seek to reopen that witness's deposition based on (among other possible grounds) the Plaintiffs' failure to provide the final version of the Exhibits List prior to the deposition and Plaintiffs reserve all rights to oppose such an effort. Except as provided herein, the Special Master Order Related to November 9, 2011 Conference shall remain in full force and effect. (Signed by Special Master Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 2/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al. (ft)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER OF ADMISSION PRO HACE VICE: David L. Moses is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Robert Aaron in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Special Master Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 2/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al. (ft)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 681 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #66: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters fothe month of January, which will be docketed for the parties review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, on February 10 1 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(cd)
February 6, 2012 Filing 680 RESPONSE re: (677 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) The Mayer Brown Defendants' Response to the SPhinX Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the Report & Recommendation of the Special Master on the Motions To Dismiss Brought by the Mayer Brown Defendants. Document filed by Edward S. Best, Mayer Brown LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
February 6, 2012 Filing 679 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Support re: (678 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 563 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1377 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Response,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
February 6, 2012 Filing 678 RESPONSE re: (1375 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 676 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection to Report and Recommendations, /Plaintiffs' Response to the Mayer Brown Defendants' Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on the Motions to Dismiss Brought by the Mayer Brown Defendants. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
January 27, 2012 Filing 677 Objection re: (1361 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Report and Recommendations,,,, SPhinX Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Motions to Dismiss Brought by the Mayer Brown Defendants. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Andelin, Lee)
January 27, 2012 Filing 676 OBJECTION to (661 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Report and Recommendations of the Special Master on the Motions To Dismiss Brought by the Mayer Brown Defendants Document filed by Edward S. Best, Mayer Brown LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support with Exhibits)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas)
January 27, 2012 Filing 675 ANSWER to 134 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P..(Capra, James)
January 27, 2012 Filing 674 RESPONSE re: (1356 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 656 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 543 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) Response to Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the Report & Recommendation Concerning Grant Thornton LLP and Mark Ramler. Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Koo, Calvin)
January 27, 2012 Filing 673 RESPONSE re: (1357 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 544 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 657 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection to Report and Recommendations, /Plaintiffs' Response to Statement by Grant Thornton LLP and Mark Ramler Concerning the Report & Recommendation of their Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
January 24, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 1/24/2012 on Objections to Mag. Judge's Report & Recommendation. (mro)
January 23, 2012 Filing 672 ANSWER to 134 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Mark Kavanagh.(Karlan, Mitchell)
January 23, 2012 Filing 671 ANSWER to 134 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Brian Owens.(Karlan, Mitchell)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER OF ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Daniel P. Shanahan is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Mayer Brown LLP in this matter in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Motions terminated: (640 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1339 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Daniel P. Shanahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Mayer Brown LLP. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/20/2012) (ft)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 669 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #65: Pursuant to Case Management Order #64, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in December 2011 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(pl)
January 19, 2012 Filing 668 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Elizabeth Cuneo on behalf of Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Cuneo, Lauren)
January 19, 2012 Filing 667 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian T. Fitzpatrick on behalf of Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Fitzpatrick, Brian)
January 19, 2012 Filing 666 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Calvin Kai-Xin Koo on behalf of Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Koo, Calvin)
January 19, 2012 Filing 665 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/14/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 19, 2012 Filing 664 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/14/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 19, 2012 Filing 663 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 12/14/2011 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/14/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 19, 2012 Filing 662 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Jane Maxwell on behalf of Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Maxwell, Caroline)
January 17, 2012 Filing 661 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON MOTION TO DISMISS BROUGHT BY THE MAYER BROWN DEFENDANTS: re: (68 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Mayer Brown LLP, (210 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Edward S. Best, Mayer Brown LLP. For these reasons and incorporating the analysis in the Owens and Kavanagh R and R, the Plaintiffs claim against the Mayer Brown Defendants for aiding and abetting tortious interference should be dismissed with prejudice. The claims against the Mayer Brown Defendants in Count XVII should be dismissed with prejudice to the extent they seek recovery of assets placed with Refco before the date of Mayer Browns wrongful conduct. In all other respects, the Defendants motion to dismiss should be denied. The claims against the Mayer Brown Defendants in Count XVIII should be dismissed with prejudice because the Plaintiffs have not adequately alleged scienter. The claims against the Mayer Brown Defendants in Count XIX should be dismissed with prejudice because the Plaintiffs have not adequately alleged scienter. The claims against the Mayer Brown Defendants in Count XXVI should be dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Special Master Daniel J. Capra on 1/17/2012) (jfe)
January 11, 2012 Filing 660 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT: Having received no objections, the Special Master hereby orders that the Case Accountant shall pay itself a total of $1,369.47 from the escrow account in this MDL, with half of that amount ($684.74) attributed to the Plaintiffs' Coordinating Committee and the other half to the Defendants' Coordinating Committee. (Signed by Hon. Ronald Hedges, Special Master on 1/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al. (ab)
January 11, 2012 Filing 659 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/14/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 11, 2012 Filing 658 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 12/14/2011 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 10, 2012 Filing 657 OBJECTION to (538 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 644 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1343 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Report and Recommendations : Statement by Grant Thornton LLP and Mark Ramler Document filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Koo, Calvin)
January 10, 2012 Filing 656 Objection re: (538 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 644 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1343 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Report and Recommendations,,, /SPhinX Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the December 16, 2011 Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Motions to Dismiss Brought by Grant Thornton LLP and Mark Ramler. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
January 5, 2012 Filing 655 DECLARATION of Mason C. Simpson in Support re: (541 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 654 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1353 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Response,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H (Part 1 of 4), #9 Exhibit H (Part 2 of 4), #10 Exhibit H (Part 3 of 4), #11 Exhibit H (Part 4 of 4), #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
January 5, 2012 Filing 654 RESPONSE re: (1341 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 642 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) /Plaintiffs' Response to the Limited Objection of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC and Banc of America Securities LLC to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on the Bank Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
January 5, 2012 Filing 653 DECLARATION of Jeremy S. Winer in Support re: (652 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1351 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Response,. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Anker, Philip)
January 5, 2012 Filing 652 RESPONSE re: (641 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1340 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Anker, Philip)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 651 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 64: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters for the month of December, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, on January 10, 2012. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(rdz)
January 3, 2012 Filing 650 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Lee Boone on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Banc of America Securities LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Boone, Robert)
January 3, 2012 Filing 649 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter J. Macdonald on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co., Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Macdonald, Peter)
December 30, 2011 Filing 648 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/1/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 30, 2011 Filing 647 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 12/1/2011 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 22, 2011 Filing 646 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: On March 14, 2012 at 4PM, a status conference will take place before Special Master Hedges in the US Courthouse. The agenda for the status conference shall include, among potentially other items, any (a) contemplated motions to sever, and (b) contemplated Plaintiffs shall serve their expert reports on or before June 15, 2012. Fact depositions shall end on or before July 31, 2012. Defendants shall serve their expert reports on or before July 31, 2012. On August 1, 2012, as status conference shall take place before Special Master Hedges at 4PM in the U.S. Courthouse. The agenda for the status conference shall include, among potentially other items, any (a) contemplated motions to sever, and (b) contemplated Plaintiffs shall serve their expert reports on or before June 15, 2012. Status Conference set for 8/1/2012 at 04:00 PM before Special Master Ronald J. Hedges. (Signed by Ronald J. Hedges on 12/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1:11-cv-01486-JSR(rdz)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 645 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Defendants Mark Kavanagh and Brian Owens and Plaintiffs in the above-captioned action, Krys, et al., v. Sugrue, et al., Nos. 08-cv-3065 (JSR), 08-cv-3086 (JSR), by their undersigned counsel, that the time within which Defendants may answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is extended to and including January 23, 2012. (Signed by Special Master Ronald J. Hedges on 12/22/2011) (pl) Modified on 12/23/2011 (ae).
December 21, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #640 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 12/14/2011, Receipt Number 1024438. (jd)
December 21, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #629 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $200.00, paid on 12/14/2011, Receipt Number 1024433. (jd)
December 20, 2011 Filing 643 DECLARATION of Ross E. Firsenbaum re: (1341 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 642 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) In Support of the Limited Objection., DECLARATION of Ross E. Firsenbaum in Support re: (1341 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 642 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Bank of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 6), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 6), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 6), #4 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 6), #5 Exhibit A (Part 5 of 6), #6 Exhibit A (Part 6 of 6), #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Anker, Philip)
December 20, 2011 Filing 642 Objection re: (632 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1322 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Report and Recommendations,,,, /Limited. Document filed by Bank of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Anker, Philip)
December 20, 2011 Filing 641 Objection re: (531 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 632 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1322 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Report and Recommendations,,,, /SPhinX Plaintiffs' Limited Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Motions to Dismiss Brought by the Bank Defendants. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
December 19, 2011 Filing 639 DECLARATION of Walter Rieman in Support re: (638 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 535 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1337 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Response,,,,. Document filed by 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, David V. Harkins, Thomas H. Lee, Scott A. Schoen, THL Equity Advisors V.L.P, THL Managers V. LLC, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee, David V. Harkings, Thomas H. Lee Partners L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Rieman, Walter)
December 19, 2011 Filing 638 RESPONSE re: (1323 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 532 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 633 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) / Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Motion to Dismiss Brought by the THL Defendants Dated November 27, 2011. Document filed by 1997 Thomas H. Lee Nominee Trust, David V. Harkins, Thomas H. Lee, Scott A. Schoen, THL Equity Advisors V.L.P, THL Managers V. LLC, Thomas H. Lee Advisors, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V. L.P, Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Investors Limited Partnership, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee, David V. Harkings, Thomas H. Lee Partners L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Rieman, Walter)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 637 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES, ETC.: that, subject to further modification, any discovery disputes that exist as of August 31, 2011 but have not been brought to the attention of the Special Master shall be brought to the Special Master's attention by that date or shall be deemed waived. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by the same date, coordinating counsel shall submit to both special masters and the Court a joint summary of the status of all actions. So Ordered, nunc pro tunc 8/31/2011. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/16/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(pl)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 636 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #63: that pursuant to Case Management Order #62, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in November 2011 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/19/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(pl)
December 16, 2011 Filing 644 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF SPECIAL MASTER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS BROUGHT BY GRANT THORNTON LLP AND MARK RAMLER: 1. The claims against GT and Ramler in Count XVII should be dismissed with prejudice to the extent they seek recovery of assets placed at RCM before the date of GTs first clean audit opinion. In all other respects, the Defendants motion to dismiss should be denied. 2. The claims against GT and Ramler in Count XVIII should be dismissed with prejudice because the Plaintiffs have not adequately alleged scienter. 3. The claims against GT and Ramler in Count XIX should be dismissed with prejudice because the Plaintiffs have not adequately alleged scienter. (Signed by Special Master Daniel J. Capra on 12/16/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jfe)
December 16, 2011 Motion No Longer Referred: re: (53 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Grant Thornton LLP, (469 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mayer Brown International LLP, Mayer Brown LLP, (1235 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Grant Thornton LLP's Third-Party Complaint For Contribution. filed by THL Equity Advisors V, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., David V. Harkins, THL Managers V, LLC, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., Scott A. Schoen, (1081 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss Grant Thornton LLP's Third-Party Complaint For Contribution. filed by THL Equity Advisors V, LLC, Thomas H. Lee Parallel Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Partners, L.P., David V. Harkins, THL Managers V, LLC, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee, Thomas H. Lee Equity (Cayman) Fund V, L.P., Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P., Scott A. Schoen, (199 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Grant Thornton LLP, Mark Ramler. Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jfe)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER OF ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: It is hereby Ordered that Daniel P. Shanahan is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Mayer Brown LLP. (Signed by Special Master Ronald Hedges on 12/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mro)
December 14, 2011 Filing 640 MOTION for Daniel P. Shanahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Mayer Brown LLP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(bwa) (pgu).
December 12, 2011 Filing 634 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Mayer Brown LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits in Support of Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 12/12/2011 (db).
December 12, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Edward Weissman to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Nos. [1324 in 07md1902, 634 in 08cv3086] Motions Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(db)
December 8, 2011 Filing 633 Objection re: (1311 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 627 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 526 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Report and Recommendations,,,, /Plaintiffs' Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Motion to Dismiss Brought by the THL Defendants Dated November 27, 2011. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
December 8, 2011 Filing 632 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS BROUGHT BY THE BANK DEFENDANTS: For all these reasons, the Plaintiffs claim against Chase for aiding and abetting tortious interference should be dismissed with prejudice. Conclusion on Count XXVI. Count XXVI should be dismissed as to Chase in its entirety with prejudice. 1. The claims against Chase in Count XVI should be dismissed with prejudice. 2. The claims against Chase in Count XIX should be dismissed with prejudice. 3. Count XXI should be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. 4. The claims in Count XXII should be dismissed with prejudice, with the exception that the Defendants motion to dismiss should be denied as to the claims for damages due to loss of assets placed with Refco after the date of the release of the LBO-related public statements on which Credit Suisse and BAS allegedly assisted. 5. The claims against Chase in Count XXVI should be dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Special Master on 12/8/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jfe)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 631 MEMORANDUM ORDER for (244 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 240 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 197 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR) Motion to Dismiss filed by Brian Owens and Mark Kavanagh: The Court hereby adopts the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master in full as if incorporated herein and likewise adopts its recommendations. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close document number 197 on the docket of 08 Civ. 3065, document number 244 on the docket of 08 Civ. 3086, and document number 240 on the docket of 07 MDL 1902. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/6/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR (ab)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 630 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #62: The Court has received the bills from the Special Masters for the month of November, which will be docketed for the parties' review. Any party who wishes to object to any bill must submit such objection to the Court in writing no later than one week from today, on 12/9/2011. If no objections are received, the Case Accountant will be authorized to pay the bills out of the established account. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/2/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(ft)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER OF ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that JOHN S. WILLIAMS is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Mayer Brown LLP. (Signed by Special Master Ronald Hedges on 12/1/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(mro)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER FOR ADMISSION OF KENNETH Y. TURNBULL PRO HAC VICE: It is hereby ordered that Kenneth Y. Turnbull is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers. (Signed by Special Master Ronald Hedges on 11/28/2011) (js)
November 27, 2011 Filing 627 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER ON MOTION TO DISMISS BROUGHT BY THE THL DEFENDANTS: The arguments recycled by the Plaintiffs and rejected by the Standing R and R and the "With Prejudice" R and R continue to be unavailing. And the new arguments raised in the Plaintiffs brief do not support any divergence from the basic principle established in those R and Rs and Orders of Judge Rakoff. Kirschner has settled claims for the same wrong alleged by the Plaintiffs. Allowing the Plaintiffs to proceed with their claims against THL raises the specter of double recovery that the prudential standing doctrine is designed to avoid. Because the Plaintiffs claims are for a secondary injury, and the Trustee has fairly settled the primary claims of the Refco Estate for the same harm, the Plaintiffs claims against THL should be dismissed with prejudice. The Plaintiffs claims against the THL Defendants the entirety of Count XXV of the Amended Complaint should be dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Special Master Daniel J. Capra on 11/27/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(jfe) Modified on 11/30/2011 (jfe).
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 626 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: (91 in 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 608 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1275 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) MOTION for Certification of the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Refco Fraud Claims on Grounds of In Pari Delicto (Defendants' Notice of Motion). MOTION for Certification of the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Refco Fraud Claims on Grounds of In Pari Delicto (Defendants' Notice of Motion). filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Bank of America Securities LLC. Accordingly, defendants' motion for certification for interlocutory appeal is hereby denied. The Clerk of the Court directed to close document number 91 on the docket sheet for 10 Civ. 3594, document number 608 on the docket sheet for 08 Civ. 3086, and document number 1275 on the docket sheet for 07 MDL 1902.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/21/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR(djc)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 625 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #61: Pursuant to Case Management Order #60, the time for objections to the bills of the Special Masters for services rendered in October 2011 has elapsed. Since the Court did not receive any objection to those bills, the Court hereby directs the Case Accountant to pay the bills forthwith. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/21/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR et al.(djc)
November 21, 2011 Filing 624 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER RELATED TO NOVEMBER 9, 2011 CONFERENCE: In Krys v. Aaron, 08 Civ. 7416 (JSR), the time within which third-party defendants Patrina Farquharson and Andrew Feighery may answer, move, or otherwise plead with respect to the Third-Party Complaint be and hereby is extended by thirty days, to and including December 8, 2011. In Kirschner v. Grant Thornton LLP, 07 Civ. 11604 (JSR), counsel for plaintiff is to confer with counsel for the remaining defendants so that a notice of dismissal can be submitted within thirty days of the date of entry of this Order. In Thomas H. Lee Equity Fund V, L.P. v. Bennett, 05 Civ. 09608 (JSR), within thirty days of the date of entry of this Order, plaintiff is to advise the Court as to whether it intends to dismiss the action. In Krys v. Sugrue, 08 Civ. 3065 (JSR) and 08 Civ. 3086 (JSR), the stay regarding the action against defendant Robert Trosten will be lifted on January 30, 2012, and defendant Trosten will answer, move, or otherwise plead on January 30, 2012. ( Responses due by 12/8/2011) (Signed by Ronald J. Hedges, Special Master on 11/18/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:05-cv-09608-JSR, 1:07-cv-11604-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR(jfe)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 623 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 9/30/2012. Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2012. The Court, by further order, shall set subsequent deadlines for the filing of motions for summary judgment and other pretrial matters in the Actions. The parties in the Actions shall conduct a meet-and-confer pursuant to Rule 26(f), as needed, and shall send proposed scheduling orders incorporating a discovery plan to Special Master Hedges thereafter. The next status conference shall take place on 12/14/2011 at a time and location to be set by Special Master Hedges. (Signed by Special Master on 11/18/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1:08-cv-07416-JSR, 1:10-cv-03594-JSR, 1:11-cv-01486-JSR(ft)
November 17, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. answer due 1/27/2012. (ft)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 622 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLP MAY ANSWER AMENDED COMPLAINT: The time within which PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP may answer the Amended Complaint is hereby extended through and including 1/27/2012. (Signed by Special Master Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 11/17/2011) (ft)
November 15, 2011 Filing 621 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (517 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1293 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 618 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme. Document filed by Mari Ferris, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Capra, James)
November 14, 2011 Filing 620 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES: Mr. Ginsberg shall produce unredacted copies of the documents as identified in the charts attached at Exhibit A to counsel for Messrs. Kavanagh and Owens and the DPM Defendants within three (3) days from the entry of this Order (the "Compliance Date"). Production of the documents identified in paragraph 1 of this Order to any parties in the Refco MDL, including Messrs. Kavanagh and Owens and the DPM Defendants, does not constitute a waiver or forfeiture of any privilege, attorney-client or attorney work product or otherwise, that Mr. Ginsberg or his clients would otherwise be entitled to assert with respect to any other documents, communications and/or information - including other documents, communications and/or information related to the subject matter of the documents identified in paragraph 1 of this Order. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Honorable Ronald Hedges, Special Master on 11/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(pl)
November 8, 2011 Filing 619 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (517 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1293 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 618 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recomme. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-md-01902-JSR, 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 1:08-cv-03086-JSR(Molton, David)
November 8, 2011 Filing 618 MOTION for Reconsideration re; (514 in 1:08-cv-03065-JSR, 615 in 1:08-cv-03086-JSR, 1287 in 1:07-md-01902-JSR) Order,, /Notice of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's October 25, 2011 Order adopting the August 10, 2011 Report and Recommendation of the Special Master on Motions to Dismiss Brought by Defendants PricewaterhouseCoopers and Mari Ferris. Document filed by Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as joint official Liquidators of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus Spc Ltd., Sphinx distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., Sphinx Long/Short Equity Ltd., et al), Margot Macinnis(as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al.), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al.), The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd., Kenneth M. Krys, Kenneth M. Krys(as Trustee of the Sphinx Trust), Kenneth M. Krys( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis( as assignee of claims assigned by Miami Childrens Hospital Foundation, OFI Asset Management, Green & Smith Investment Management LLC, Thales Fund Management LLC, Kellner Dileo & Co. LLC, Martingale Asset Management LP, Longacre Fund Management LLC, et al), Margot Macinnis(as joint official liquidator of Sphinx Ltd., Sphinx Strategy Fund Ltd., Sphinx Plus SPC LTD, Sphinx Distressed Ltd., Sphinx Merger Arbitrage, Ltd., Sphinx Special Situations Ltd., Sphinx Macro Ltd., et al), Kenneth M Krys. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)