Myrie v. Bailey et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Myrie, Jr.
Defendant: Emmanuel Bailey, Scantelbury and Sandra Sheard
Case Number: 1:2008cv03278
Filed: April 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
County: Bronx
Presiding Judge: Kimba M. Wood
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Plaintiff having failed to appear for a Court ordered Pretrial Conference on July 8, 2009 and having failed to advise the Court as to his present address by August 7, 2009, as ordered by the Court on July 8, 2009, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 8/14/2009) Copies Mailed By Chambers (jpo)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/09 is adjourned to 6/30/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert P. Patterson. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 6/12/09) Copies sent by chambers.(cd)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: During a conference held on February 11, 2009, the parties agreed to Pro Se Mediation on the record. The plaintiff made an oral request for volunteer counsel to represent him for mediation, the Pro Se Office of this Court is directed to seek volunteer counsel for plaintiff in accordance with the Pro Bono Panel's procedures. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 3/19/2009) (jpo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myrie v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Myrie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scantelbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Sheard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?