Scheinberg v. Merck & Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: Rhoda E. Scheinberg
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv04119
Filed: May 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Bronx
Presiding Judge: John F. Keenan
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated above, Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law is denied. Re: 156 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Merck & Co., Inc. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/1/2013) (rjm)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 51 in 1:08-cv-04119-JFK MOTION in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence. filed by Merck & Co., Inc. Before the Court is a multitude of motions in limine filed by both parties in advance of trial. The Court will address each motion in turn. As set forth herein. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/15/2013) (ama)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION AND ORDER re: (26 in 1:08-cv-04119-JFK) MOTION to Set Aside Expert Testimony by Dr. Suzanne Parisian on Daubert Grounds, filed by Merck & Co., Inc., (23 in 1:08-cv-04119-JFK) MOTION to Set Aside Expert Testimony on Daubert Grounds, filed by Merck & Co., Inc., (29 in 1:08-cv-04119-JFK) MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Merck & Co., Inc. For the reasons stated above, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted with respect to Plaintiff's claims for breach of warranty, fraudulent misrepresentation and concealment, and punitive damages, but denied with respect to Plaintiff's claim for design defect and failure to warn. Merck's motions to preclude expert testimony are granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's motion to preclude expert testimony is granted in part and denied in part. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/7/2013) (ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scheinberg v. Merck & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhoda E. Scheinberg
Represented By: Meghan M. Tans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?