In re: Fannie Mae 2008 Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc., David L. Frankfurt, John A. Genovese and Daniel Kramer
Defendant: Stephen B. Ashley, Banc of America Securities LLC, Robert T Blakely, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Enrico Dallavecchia, Deloitte & Touche LLP, Federal National Mortgage Association, Lehman Brothers, Inc., Robert J. Levin, Fannie Mae, Daniel Mudd, Daniel H. Mudd, Stephen M. Swad, The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc. and Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC
Petitioner: International Fund Management S.A., Luxembourg, Richard H. Moore, Martin Mahler, Phillip Melton, Roy Cooper, Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System, Danny Austin, Unisuper Limited, Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family, Horizon Asset Management, Inc., Eleanor Maro, Frankfurt Group and Insurance Group, James W. Giddens, Malka Krausz, Deka International S.A., Luxembourg, Massachusetts Public Pension Funds, Alameda County Employees Retirement Association and Cheryl Strong
Lead Plaintiff: Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM") and Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS")
Consolidated Plaintiff: Susan Kraus, Linda P. Schweitzer, Stephen H. Schweitzer, The David Frankfurt 2002 Family Trust, Lynn Williams, Steveann Williams and the Frankfurt Family Ltd.
Consolidated Defendant: Dennis R. Beresford, Deutsche Banc Securities Inc., Louis J. Freeh, Brenda J. Gaines, Goldman Sachs & CO., David Hisey, Karen N. Horn, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Bridget A. Macaskill, Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Leslie Rahl, Greg C. Sites, Patrick Swygert, UBS Securities LLC and John K. Wulff
Intervenor Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Case Number: 1:2008cv07831
Filed: September 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2018 Filing 579 NOTICE of Withdrawal Of Attorney. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Walsh, Michael)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF JEFFREY W. KILDUFF AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT FANNIE MAE: on re: #577 Notice (Other) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Based on the representation that it will have no effect on the litigation of this matter, the motion for withdrawal of Jeffrey W. Kilduff as counsel for defendant Fannie Mae is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to remove Jeffrey W. Kilduff as counsel of record for defendant Fannie Mae. Attorney Jeffrey W. Kilduff terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/2/2018) (ap)
December 28, 2017 Filing 577 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jeffrey W. Kilduff. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kilduff, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2017 Filing 576 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name. Document filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). (Barenbaum, Daniel)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 575 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #574 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Based on the representation that it will have no effect on the litigation of this matter, the motion for withdrawal of Glen DeValerio as counsel for plaintiff Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to remove Glen DeValerio as counsel of record for plaintiff Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board. SO ORDERED. Attorney Glen DeValerio terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/20/2017) (rj) Modified on 7/27/2017 (rj).
July 19, 2017 Filing 574 MOTION for Glen DeValerio to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saif, Justin)
February 23, 2017 Filing 573 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Daniel E. Barenbaum on behalf of Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). New Address: Berman DeValerio, 44 Montgomery Street, Suite 650, San Francisco, CA, USA 94104, (415) 433-3200. (Barenbaum, Daniel)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER APPROVING ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS AND AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF THE NET SETTLEMENT FUND granting #568 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. This Court has retained jurisdiction over this Action for the purposes of considering, inter alia, any further application or matter in connection with the administration of the Settlement and the distribution of the net settlement fund for the Common Stock Class and the net settlement fund for the Preferred Stock Class (together, "Net Settlement Funds"), to Authorized Claimants. 2. The distribution plan proposed by A.B. Data as set forth in the Walter Declaration is APPROVED, as further set out in the order. 3. This Court retains jurisdiction over any further application or matter that may arise in connection with the administration of the Settlement and such other and further relief as this Court deems appropriate. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/27/2016) (cla) Modified on 11/21/2016 (cla).
October 20, 2016 Filing 571 DECLARATION of Adam D. Walter in Support re: #568 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Gottlieb, Louis)
October 20, 2016 Filing 570 DECLARATION of Daniel Barenbaum, Louis Gottlieb, and Donald Hall in Support re: #568 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gottlieb, Louis)
October 20, 2016 Filing 569 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #568 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds . . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Gottlieb, Louis)
October 20, 2016 Filing 568 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gottlieb, Louis)
October 17, 2016 Filing 567 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Lead Counsel dated 10/17/2016 re: Fannie Mae Distribution Motion. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS").(Gottlieb, Louis)
October 7, 2016 Filing 566 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Thomas D. Frey re: Final Judgment. (cla)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISTRIBUTE SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS: IT IS on this 28th day of June, 2016: ORDERED that the following relief is granted by the Court: 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to accept for filing a disc containing the exhibits to the distribution motion in regular PDF format. The disc will not be uploaded to the Court's ECF system and it will be placed in the official court file. 2. Courtesy copies of the exhibits can be provided to Chambers on disc rather than in hard copy. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/28/2016) (lmb)
June 28, 2016 Filing 564 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Louis Gottlieb dated 6/28/2016 re: Request to file the exhibits to the motion for distribution of settlement funds on disc. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gottlieb, Louis)
April 28, 2015 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (lmb)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 563 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff, Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc., and Defendants Fannie Mae, Daniel H. Mudd and Enrico Dallavecchia filed a joint stipulation of dismissal seeking to dismiss all claims between Plaintiff and Defendants with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. The Court is of the opinion that the stipulation should be, and is hereby, GRANTED. It is, therefore, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims asserted in this cause between Plaintiff, Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc., and Defendants Fannie Mae, Daniel H. Mudd and Enrico Dallavecchia are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/28/2015) (lmb)
April 27, 2015 Filing 562 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Edward Smith and Defendants in the above-action action stipulate to dismissal with prejudice of all claims in the Smith action against all Defendants. Each of the parties shall be responsible for their own fees and costs incurred in this action. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/27/2015) (spo)
April 24, 2015 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO EMAIL DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney David Thorpe to E-MAIL Document No. #561 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. This document is not filed via ECF. (km)
April 23, 2015 Filing 561 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Enrico Dallavecchia, Fannie Mae, Daniel H. Mudd and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Edward Smith.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Thorpe, David) Modified on 4/24/2015 (km).
April 23, 2015 Filing 560 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James D. Wareham on behalf of Daniel H. Mudd. New Address: Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP, 801 17th Street, NW, Washington, District of Columbia, United States of America 20006, 202-639-7040. (Wareham, James)
April 22, 2015 Filing 559 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James E. Anklam on behalf of Daniel H. Mudd. New Address: Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP, 801 17th Street, NW, Washington, District of Columbia, United States of America 20006, 202-639-7042. (Anklam, James)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 558 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (194 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 144 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC, 557 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) Status Report filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(lmb)
March 31, 2015 Filing 557 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
March 12, 2015 Filing 556 LETTER from Johanna Anderson dated 1/7/15 re: Investor Johanna Anderson writes to the Court to object to the small settlement amount which the investors are getting regarding the Class Action Suit relating to the Fannie Mae 2008 Securities Litigation; and she requests that the Court reconsider the settlement amount that goes to the investors who have been bilked out of so much.. (sc)
March 9, 2015 Filing 555 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Final Settlement Approval Conference proceeding held on 03/03/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
March 9, 2015 Filing 554 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Final Settlement Approval Conference held on 3/3/2015 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2015.(ca)
March 3, 2015 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (lmb)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 553 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that: 1. This Final Order and Judgment ("Judgment") incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulation and all capitalized terms used in this Judgment that are not otherwise defined herein shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Stipulation. 2. This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action and over all parties to the Action, including all Members of the Settlement Classes as further set forth in this order. 12. The Action and the Complaint, which the Court finds were filed on a good faith basis in accordance with the PSLRA and Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure based upon all publicly available information, are hereby dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice, and without costs to any Settling Party, except as otherwise provided in the Stipulation. 13. The Court further finds that during the course of the Action, the parties and their respective counsel at all times complied in all respects with each requirement of Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in connection with the commencement, maintenance, prosecution, defense, and settlement of the Action. 14. Upon the Effective Date, Lead Plaintiffs and each and every other Member of the Common Stock Class and the Preferred Stock Class, on behalf of themselves and each of their respective heirs, executors, trustees, administrators, predecessors, successors, and assigns, shall be deemed to have fully, finally, and forever waived, released, discharged, and dismissed each and every one of the Released Class Claims as against each and every one of the Released Defendant Parties and shall forever be BARRED, ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED from commencing, instituting, prosecuting or maintaining any and all such Released Class Claims against any and all of the Released Defendant Parties as further set forth in this order. 25. Without affecting the finality of this Judgment in any way, this Court hereby retains continuing jurisdiction over: (i) implementation of the Stipulation and Settlement; (ii) the allowance, disallowance or adjustment of any Member of the Settlement Classes's claim on equitable grounds and any award or distribution of the Settlement Fund; (iii) disposition of the Settlement Fund; (iv) hearing and determining applications for attorneys' fees, costs, interest and payment of expenses in the Action; (v) all Settling Parties for the purpose of construing, enforcing and administering the Stipulation, Settlement and this Judgment; and (vi) other matters related or ancillary to the foregoing. There is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Judgment and immediate entry by the Clerk of the Court is expressly directed. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/3/2015) (lmb)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES: granting #540 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: 1. The Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of this Action and over all parties to the Action, including all Members of the Settlement Classes and the Claims Administrator. 2. Notice of Lead Counsel's motion for attorneys' fees and payment of expenses was given to all Members of the Settlement Classes who could be identified with reasonable effort. The form and method of notifying the Settlement Classes of the motion for attorneys' fees and expenses met the requirements of Rules 23 and 54 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Section 21D(a)(7) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(7), as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 (the "PSLRA"), due process, and any other applicable law, constituted the best notice practicable under the circumstances, and constituted due and sufficient notice to all persons and entities entitled thereto. 3. Lead Counsel is hereby awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of 17.65% of the Settlement Fund and payment of litigation expenses in the amount of $2,057,321, which sums the Court finds to be fair and reasonable. 4. In accordance with 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(4), for their representation of the Settlement Classes, the Court hereby awards Lead Plaintiff PRIM $42,433.39, Lead Plaintiff SBRB $13,410, and Lead Plaintiff TCRS $58,110, as reimbursement of their reasonable lost wages and expenses directly related to their representation. 5. The award of attorneys' fees and expenses may be paid to Lead Counsel from the Settlement Fund immediately upon entry of this Order, subject to the terms, conditions, and obligations of the Stipulation, which terms, conditions, and obligations are incorporated herein as further set forth in this order. 9. In the event that the Settlement is terminated or does not become Final or the Effective Date does not occur in accordance with the terms of the Stipulation, this order shall be rendered null and void to the extent provided by the Stipulation and shall be vacated in accordance with the Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/3/2015) (lmb)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION: granting #537 Motion for Settlement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: 1. Pursuant to and in compliance with Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court hereby finds and concludes that due and adequate notice of these proceedings was directed to all persons and entities who are Members of the Settlement Classes advising them of the Plan of Allocation and of their right to object thereto, and a full and fair opportunity was accorded to persons and entities who are Members of the Settlement Classes to be heard with respect to the Plan of Allocation. There has been one objection to the Plan of Allocation, which is hereby rejected. 2. The Court hereby finds and concludes that the Plan of Allocation for the calculation of the claims of Authorized Claimants that is set forth in the Notice of (I) Proposed Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation; (II) Settlement Hearing; And (III) Requests for Awards of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses ("Notice"), which was disseminated to Members of the Settlement Classes, provides a fair and reasonable basis upon which to allocate the net settlement proceeds among Members of the Settlement Classes. 3. The Court hereby finds and concludes that the Plan of Allocation set forth in the Notice is, in all respects, fair and reasonable, and the Court hereby approves the Plan of Allocation. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/3/2015) (lmb)
March 3, 2015 Filing 550 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Final Settlement Approval Conference held on 3/3/2015. REMARK: The Court "so ordered" the proposed: (1) Order Approving Plan of Allocation; (2) Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, and (3) Final Order and Judgment. See transcript for complete details of this proceeding. The transcript "order form" is attached to this entry. In the alternative, visit------ http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php -------with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Courtflow." (mov)
February 27, 2015 Filing 549 DECLARATION of Adam D. Walter on behalf of A.B. Data Ltd. in Support re: #540 MOTION for Attorney Fees ., #537 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval.. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Dubbs, Thomas)
February 27, 2015 Filing 548 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #540 MOTION for Attorney Fees ., #537 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval. Lead Plaintiffs' Supplement Concerning Late Objections and Requests for Exclusions. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Final Order and Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Approving Plan of Allocation, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses)(Dubbs, Thomas)
February 17, 2015 Filing 547 DECLARATION of Adam D. Walter in Support re: #537 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval., #540 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Part 1, #2 Exhibit A-Part 2, #3 Exhibit A-Part 3, #4 Exhibit A-Part 4, #5 Exhibit A-Part 5, #6 Exhibit A-Part 6, #7 Exhibit A-Part 7, #8 Exhibit B)(Dubbs, Thomas)
February 17, 2015 Filing 546 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #540 MOTION for Attorney Fees ., #537 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval. . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Order and Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Approving Plan of Allocation, #3 Proposed Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses)(Dubbs, Thomas)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF DAVID J. STANOCH AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT ENRICO DALLAVECCHIA granting #543 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion for withdrawal of David J. Stanoch as counsel for defendant Enrico Dallavecchia is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to remove David J. Stanoch as counsel of record for defendant Enrico Dallavecchia. Attorney David J. Stanoch terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/9/2015) (kko)
February 6, 2015 Filing 544 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Hun Park on behalf of Enrico Dallavecchia. (Park, Michael)
February 6, 2015 Filing 543 MOTION for David J. Stanoch to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waldman, Rebecca)
January 17, 2015 Filing 542 DECLARATION of Glen DeValerio, Thomas A. Dubbs, Frederic S. Fox in Support re: #537 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval., #540 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Dubbs, Thomas)
January 17, 2015 Filing 541 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #540 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Dubbs, Thomas)
January 16, 2015 Filing 540 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). Return Date set for 3/3/2015 at 03:00 PM.(Dubbs, Thomas)
January 16, 2015 Filing 539 DECLARATION of Glen DeValerio, Thomas A. Dubbs, Fredric S. Fox in Support re: # 537 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Dubbs, Thomas)
January 16, 2015 Filing 538 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 537 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval . . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Dubbs, Thomas)
January 16, 2015 Filing 537 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). Return Date set for 3/3/2015 at 03:00 PM.(Dubbs, Thomas)
January 16, 2015 Filing 536 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sarah Elizabeth Trombley on behalf of Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). New Address: Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General, One Ashburton Pl., 18th Floor, APT 6143, Boston, MA, United States 02108, 212-963-2395. (Trombley, Sarah)
January 16, 2015 Filing 535 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Elizabeth Trombley on behalf of Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). (Trombley, Sarah)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 534 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (140 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC, 191 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 533 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) Status Report filed by Federal National Home Mortgage Association. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/31/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(tn)
December 30, 2014 Filing 533 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Federal National Home Mortgage Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 532 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Tobias James Stern terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/22/2014) ***As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(tn)
December 10, 2014 Filing 531 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/12/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 10, 2014 Filing 530 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/12/2014 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ADAM VAN ALSTYNE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT DANIEL H. MUDD: granting # 528 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Based on the representations that it will have no effect on the litigation of this matter, the motion for withdrawal of Adam van Alstyne as counsel for defendant Daniel H. Mudd is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to remove Adam van Alstyne as counsel of record for defendant Daniel H. Mudd. Attorney Adam James van Alstyne terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/5/2014) (lmb) Modified on 12/5/2014 (lmb).
December 4, 2014 Filing 528 MOTION for Adam van Alstyne to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Daniel H. Mudd . Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Permitting Withdrawal of Appearance of Adam van Alstyne)(Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Hearing set for 3/3/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (lmb)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, APPROVING FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE, AND SETTING DATE FOR HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT: granting # 521 Motion for Settlement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, this 12th day of November, 2014 that: 1. The Court preliminarily finds the Settlement set forth in the Stipulation to be fair, reasonable and adequate, subject to further consideration at the Settlement Hearing described below. 2. Pursuant to Rules 23(a) and (b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court hereby certifies, for the purposes of the Settlement only, the Common Stock Class consisting of: all Persons who, during the Class Period, either on the secondary market or through an original offering pursuant to a registration statement or prospectus: (a) purchased or acquired Fannie Mae common stock and/or call options and/or (b) sold Fannie Mae common stock put options, and were thereby damaged as further set forth in this order. 7. A hearing (the "Settlement Hearing") pursuant to Rule 23(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is hereby scheduled to be held before the Court on March 3, 2015, at 3 p.m. in Courtroom 14-C, 500 Pearl St. for the following purposes as further set forth in this order. 27. The Court retains exclusive jurisdiction over the Action to consider all further matters arising out of or connected with the Settlement. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/12/2014) (lmb)
November 10, 2014 Calendar Entry **Courtroom Change**: The Pretrial Conference to discuss the pending motion scheduled to go forward on: Wednesday, November 12, 2014 at 03:15 PM will take place in Courtroom 6A *(NOT 14C*), 500 Pearl Street, before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY --- (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
November 4, 2014 Filing 526 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Michael John Walsh on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association. Re: # 525 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Walsh, Michael)
November 4, 2014 Filing 525 NOTICE of CAFA Compliance. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Walsh, Michael)
November 4, 2014 Filing 524 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole M. Zeiss on behalf of Boston Retirement Board. (Zeiss, Nicole)
October 29, 2014 Calendar Entry: A Pretrial Conference to discuss the pending motion is scheduled to go forward on: Wednesday, November 12, 2014 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail the Courtroom Deputy with alternate dates at: Marlon_Ovalles@nysd.uscourts.gov --- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY --- (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy).(mov)
October 24, 2014 Filing 523 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 521 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and related relief . . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Dubbs, Thomas)
October 24, 2014 Filing 522 DECLARATION of Glen Devalerio, Thomas A. Dubbs and Frederic S. Fox in Support re: # 521 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and related relief .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Dubbs, Thomas)
October 24, 2014 Filing 521 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and related relief . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dubbs, Thomas)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 520 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (188 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 135 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC, 519 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) Status Report filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/1/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(lmb)
September 29, 2014 Filing 519 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
September 9, 2014 Calendar Entry: In light of the 8/28/14 Order granting the stipulation to modify the Scheduling Order, the previously scheduled 9/23/14 conference before Judge Crotty is marked off the "sine die." A PDF is not attached to this entry (By: Marlon Ovalles, Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon consideration of the Parties' stipulation to modify the Fourth Amended Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order ("Fourth Scheduling Order") entered April 17, 2014 (Dkt. No. 127) and for good cause appearing therefrom, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stipulation is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Fourth Amended Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 127) shall be modified as follows: All fact discovery to be completed no later than January 30, 2015. All expert discovery to be completed no later than July 3, 2015. Deadline by which to file motions for summary judgment and Daubert motions, due by September 14, 2015. Deadline by which to file opposition to motions for summary judgment and Daubert motions due by November 10, 2015. Deadline by which to file replies in support of motions for summary judgment and Daubert motions, due by December 28, 2015, and as further set forth herein. (Expert Discovery due by 7/3/2015, Fact Discovery due by 1/30/2015, Motions due by 9/14/2015, Responses due by 11/10/2015, Replies due by 12/28/2015.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 8/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(ja) Modified on 8/29/2014 (ja).
August 15, 2014 Filing 517 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Mark K. Gyandoh and Robert I. Harwood dated August 15, 2014 re: Extension Request. Document filed by Stephen B. Ashley, Dennis R. Beresford, Louis J. Freeh, Brenda J. Gaines, David Hisey, Bridget A. Macaskill, Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gyandoh, Mark)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWL OF DIANE PRINCAS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT ENRICO DALLAVECCHIA granting (514) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: the motion for withdrawal of Diane Princ as counsel for defendant Enrico Dallavecchia is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to remove Diane Princ as counsel of record for defendant Enrico Dallavecchia. Attorney Diane Nicole Princ terminated in case 1:08-cv-07831-PAC. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/30/2014) ***As per chambers, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC (tn)
July 29, 2014 Filing 514 MOTION for Diane Princ to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahan, Rebecca)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting # 512 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/9/2014) (tn)
July 8, 2014 Filing 512 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Submission of Proposed Class Certification Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 07/08/2014. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Walsh, Michael)
July 7, 2014 Filing 511 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Donald Grayson Yeargin. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Yeargin, Donald)
June 30, 2014 Filing 510 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Matthew P. Siben on behalf of Edward Smith. New Address: Dietrich Siben Thorpe LLP, 500 Australian Way South, Suite 637, West Palm Beach, Florida, U.S. 33401, (561) 820-4883. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(Siben, Matthew)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 509 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (183 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 508 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) Status Report filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/30/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(tn)
June 26, 2014 Filing 508 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 507 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (506 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) Letter filed by Daniel Kramer. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(tn)
June 16, 2014 Filing 506 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Charles R. Cohen, Esq. dated June 16, 2014 re: ECF notices. Document filed by Daniel Kramer.(Cohen, Charles)
May 22, 2014 Filing 505 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly-Ann Fayette Clarke on behalf of Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Clarke, Kelly-Ann)
May 22, 2014 Filing 504 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David John Booth on behalf of Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Booth, David)
May 21, 2014 Filing 503 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Janet LaRene Wells Rushing on behalf of Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Rushing, Janet)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER granting # 498 Motion for Janet W. Rushing to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Janet W. Rushing is directed to file a notice of appearance forthwith! (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting # 497 Motion for David J. Booth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David J. Booth is directed to file a notice of appearance forthwith! (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER granting # 496 Motion for Kelly-Ann F. Clarke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kelly-Ann F. Clarke is directed to file a notice of appearance forthwith! (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER granting # 495 Motion for Roni G.S. Mihaly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Roni G.S. Mihaly is directed to file a notice of appearance forthwith! (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
May 15, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. # 498 MOTION for Janet W. Rushing to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. , # 496 MOTION for Kelly-Ann F. Clarke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. , # 495 MOTION for Roni G.S. Mihaly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. , # 497 MOTION for David J. Booth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
May 15, 2014 Filing 498 MOTION for Janet W. Rushing to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Frisch, Andrew)
May 15, 2014 Filing 497 MOTION for David J. Booth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Frisch, Andrew)
May 15, 2014 Filing 496 MOTION for Kelly-Ann F. Clarke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Frisch, Andrew)
May 15, 2014 Filing 495 MOTION for Roni G.S. Mihaly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Frisch, Andrew)
May 1, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. # 493 MOTION for Roni G.S. Mihaly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9626965. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. , # 494 MOTION for Janet L. Rushing to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9626999. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . Missing Motion for Pro Hac Vice, and Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Texas. (wb)
May 1, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. # 493 MOTION for Roni G.S. Mihaly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9626965. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . Missing Motion for Pro Hac Vice, and certifcate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Texas. (wb)
May 1, 2014 Filing 494 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Janet L. Rushing to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9626999. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Janet L. Rushing, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 5/1/2014 (wb).
May 1, 2014 Filing 493 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Roni G.S. Mihaly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9626965. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Roni Mihaly, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit)(Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 5/1/2014 (wb).
May 1, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. # 491 MOTION for Kelly-Ann F. Clarke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9626825. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . Missing Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing Must be issued from the Supreme Court of Texas (wb)
May 1, 2014 Filing 492 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for David J. Booth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9626936. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of David J. Booth, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 5/1/2014 (wb).
May 1, 2014 Filing 491 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Kelly-Ann F. Clarke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9626825. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Kelly-Ann Clark, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 5/1/2014 (wb).
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER granting # 489 Motion for Emily Shea to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
April 24, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. # 489 MOTION for Emily Shea to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9599079. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
April 24, 2014 Filing 489 MOTION for Emily Shea to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9599079. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B- Maryland Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shea, Emily)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 488 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CERTAIN DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS AND EXHIBITS...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/22/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC (tn)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 487 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (179 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC) Notice (Other) filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Steven Carl Windsor terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/22/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC(tn)
April 21, 2014 Filing 486 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Thomas A. Dubbs dated 04/21/2014 re: Submission of proposed Supplemental Pretrial Protective Order pursuant to order of 4/8/2014. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Supplemental Pretrial Protective Order Concerning Certain Deposition Transcripts and Exhibits)(Dubbs, Thomas)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 485 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: All deadlines set forth in the Third Amended Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order issued by the Court on November 13, 2012, shall be extended by approximately 90 days pursuant to the proposed Fourth Amended Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order submitted herewith. This Stipulation may be executed in any number of counterparts, each of which shall constitute an original, but all of which together shall constitute but one and the same document. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(ft)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 484 FOURTH AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties in the Actions do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S. C. 636(c). The Actions are to be tried to a jury. Fact Discovery due by 9/29/2014. Expert Discovery due by 3/2/2015. Motions due by 5/14/2015. Responses due by 7/10/2015. Replies due by 8/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2014 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(ft)
April 17, 2014 Filing 483 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Gregory Hoffman, Jr on behalf of Boston Retirement Board. (Hoffman, Thomas)
April 17, 2014 Filing 482 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Louis Gottlieb on behalf of Boston Retirement Board. (Gottlieb, Louis)
April 16, 2014 Filing 481 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Thomas A. Dubbs dated 04/16/2014 re: submission of Stipulation and Order Regarding Discovery and Proposed Fourth Amended Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Discovery, # 2 Proposed Fourth Amended Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Dubbs, Thomas)
April 16, 2014 Filing 480 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas A. Dubbs on behalf of Boston Retirement Board. (Dubbs, Thomas)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER re: (470 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) Letter, filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Boston Retirement Board, Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"), (477 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) Letter, filed by Daniel H. Mudd, Enrico Dallavecchia: After reviewing and considering Defendants' objections, see ECF No. 477, the Court overrules them and orders Defendants to produce the transcripts and exhibits of all depositions in the SEC action. The parties should adopt a confidentiality order agreeing to be bound by the terms of the March 19, 2013 Amended Confidentiality Order in the SEC Action. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/8/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC (tn)
April 4, 2014 Filing 478 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Andrew J. Mytelka dated April 4, 2014 re: Lead Plaintiffs' March 26, 2014 Letter. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc..(Mytelka, Andrew)
April 1, 2014 Filing 477 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from James E. Anklam dated March 31, 2014 re: 3/31/2014 Letter in response to Plaintiffs' letter of March 26, 2014: Document # 470 . Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia, Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Anklam, James)
April 1, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney James E. Anklam to RE-FILE Document # 474 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: # 470 Letter, addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from James Anklam dated 03/31/2014. LETTER MOTION for Conference re: # 470 Letter, addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from James Anklam dated 03/31/2014. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
March 31, 2014 Filing 476 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 03/31/2014 re: Lead Plaintiffs' March 26, 2014 Letter. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Walsh, Michael)
March 31, 2014 Filing 475 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damien Harris Weinstein on behalf of Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Weinstein, Damien)
March 31, 2014 Filing 474 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Conference re: # 470 Letter,, addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from James Anklam dated 03/31/2014. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Anklam, James) Modified on 4/1/2014 (db).
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 473 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on (173 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC), (459 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC), (124 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC) Letter, filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(ft) Modified on 3/28/2014 (ft).
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER granting # 471 Motion for Victor S. Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
March 27, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. # 471 MOTION for Victor S. Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9504015. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 27, 2014 Filing 471 MOTION for Victor S. Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9504015. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Good Standing Certificate)(Elias, Victor)
March 26, 2014 Filing 470 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Donald R. Hall dated March 26, 2014 re: request that the Court intervene in a discovery dispute between Lead Plaintiffs and Defendants. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Hall, Donald)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER granting # 468 Motion for Katherine Marie Ruffing to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
March 19, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. # 468 AMENDED MOTION for Katherine Marie Ruffing to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 19, 2014 Filing 468 AMENDED MOTION for Katherine Marie Ruffing to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC), # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (VA), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ruffing, Katherine)
March 13, 2014 Filing 467 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Sarah Kahan on behalf of Enrico Dallavecchia. (Kahan, Rebecca)
March 13, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. # 466 MOTION for Katherine Marie Ruffing to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9452572. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificate of Good Standing. Certificate of Good Standing must be issued from the Supreme Court of Virginia and not from a State Bar Association. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (bcu)
March 13, 2014 Filing 466 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Katherine Marie Ruffing to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9452572. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC), # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (VA), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ruffing, Katherine) Modified on 3/13/2014 (bcu).
March 10, 2014 Filing 465 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam James van Alstyne on behalf of Daniel H. Mudd. (van Alstyne, Adam)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER granting # 463 Motion for Catherine Vera Wigglesworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
February 26, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. # 463 MOTION for Catherine Vera Wigglesworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9391723. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 25, 2014 Filing 463 MOTION for Catherine Vera Wigglesworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9391723. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wigglesworth, Catherine)
February 21, 2014 Filing 462 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daphne T Ha on behalf of Enrico Dallavecchia. (Ha, Daphne)
February 21, 2014 Filing 461 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Rios on behalf of Enrico Dallavecchia. (Rios, Amanda)
February 21, 2014 Filing 460 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diane Nicole Princ on behalf of Enrico Dallavecchia. (Princ, Diane)
February 3, 2014 Filing 459 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated February 3, 2014 re: Litigation Status Report. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
December 5, 2013 Filing 458 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Proceeding proceeding held on 11/06/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
December 5, 2013 Filing 457 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Proceeding held on 11/6/2013 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2014.(ca)
November 15, 2013 Filing 456 E-mail Notification: Mr. Ovalles,My firm is lead counsel for lead plaintiff, Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System, in the above referenced matter. We are scheduled to file a motion for entry of final judgment on the dismissedSecurities Act claims on Monday, November 18, 2013. I am writing to inform Judge Paul A. Crotty that upon further discussion lead plaintiffs' counsel havedecided not to file the motion. Please advise if there is anything further that needs to be done regarding this matter - Wilfred Gomes. (mov)
November 6, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Pre-Motion Conference held on 11/6/2013. REMARK: The schedule on lead plaintiffs' motion for Rule 54(b) certification of the dismissed Securities Act claims is as follows: Motion: 11/18/13, Response: 12/03/13, and Reply: 12/10/13. The Court will decide the motion shortly after it is fully briefed. See transcript for complete details of this proceeding. Visit------ http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php -------with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Courtflow." Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(mov)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (171 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 454 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 122 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC) Letter, filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. If the Court agrees that no status conference is necessary at this time, the parties can submit another status report within 90 days of the Court's endorsement of this letter if the Court so orders. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(rsh)
November 1, 2013 Filing 454 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 11/01/2013 re: Litigation Status Report. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
October 29, 2013 NOTICE of Conference: Pre-Motion Conference set for Wednesday, November 6, 2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. Requests for adjournment of the conference will be considered if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Judge Crotty's Individual Practices. A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
October 28, 2013 Filing 453 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jonathan K. Youngwood dated October 28, 2013 re: Letter response to Plaintiffs request that the Court enter a final judgment on the dismissal of Plaintiffs claims under Sections 12(a)(2) and 15 of the 1933 Securities Act.. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Banc Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.(Youngwood, Jonathan)
October 28, 2013 Filing 452 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 10/28/2013 re: opposition to plaintiffs' 10/23/2013 letter request. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Walsh, Michael)
October 23, 2013 Filing 451 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Frederic S. Fox dated 10/23/2013 re: requesting a pre-motion conference seeking permission to file a motion for Rule 54(b) certification of the dismissed Securities Act claims. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS").(Fox, Frederic)
October 10, 2013 Filing 450 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Kurtis McCulloch on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association. (McCulloch, Scott)
September 20, 2013 Filing 449 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy Helene Schwartz on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association. (Schwartz, Wendy)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 8/1/2013 re: Counsel for defendant Fannue Mac and all defendants except Daniel Mudd. We write on behalf of all parties to provide the status report. At this time none of the parties to any of the actions believe a status conference is necessary. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to submit another status report in 90 days. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 8/5/2013) (rsh)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER: Upon review of the parties letters of June 24, 2013 and June 27, 2013 and the Court's order of July 1, 2013 Plaintiffs' objections to disclosing the identities of the four confidential witnesses cited in their second amended complaint are overruled. Plaintiffs are directed to produce information and documents sufficient to identify those four confidential witnesses. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/12/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(js)
July 1, 2013 Filing 446 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Donald R. Hall, Louis Gottlieb and Daniel E. Barenbaum dated 6/27/2013 re: Counsel for Co-Lead Plaintiffs ("Plaintiffs") in the above-referenced litigation. We write in response to defendant Fannie Mae's ("Fannie") June 24, 2013 pre-motion conference letter requesting that lead Plaintiffs be compelled to disclose the identities of the four confidential witnesses cited in their amended complaint. Plaintiffs respectfully request that the Court deny Fannie's request to compel Plaintiffs to disclose confidential-witness identities at this time(js)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh Jr. dated 6/24/2013 re: On behalf of defendant Fannie Mae, we are writing to seek the Court's assistance in resolving an ongoing discovery dispute with lead Plaintiffs. Fannie Mae has requested that Lead Plaintiffs produce information and documents sufficient to identify the four confidential witnesses ("Confidential Witnesses l-4") cited in Lead Plaintiffs' Second Amended Joint Consolidated Complaint ("Second Amended Complaint"). Despite the recent case law in this District holding otherwise, Lead Plaintiffs contend that the identities of Confidential Witnesses 14 are protected from discovery. We have met and conferred multiple times with Lead Plaintiffs and exchanged correspondence, which is attached for the Court's convenience as Exhibit A. Nevertheless, we remain unable to resolve this dispute. Fannie Mae therefore respectfully requests that the Court schedule a pre-motion conference to attempt to resolve this issue or grant leave for Fannie Mae to file a motion to compel In the alternative, given the strength of the case law supporting Fannie Mae's position and in an effort to conserve the resources of the Court and the parties, Fannie Mae would consent if the Court asked the parties to rest on their letter submissions and agree to forego both the pre-motion conference and any formal briefing. ENDORSEMENT: The Court believes it has sufficient information to rule on Fannie Mae's letter request of June 24, 2013; and co-lead plaintiff's counsel response of June 27, 2013. There is no need for s pre-motion conference and the Court waives the requirement. If either party wishes to submit further briefing-although the Court perceives no need for it-that party (or both parties) may do so, but any submissions must be made by the close of business on Monday, July 8, 2013 and the submissions may not exceed 5 pages. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/1/2013) (js) Modified on 7/2/2013 (js).
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 444 MEMO ENDORSED on WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE on re: # 443 Notice (Other). PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the undersigned hereby respectfully withdraws her appearance in the above captioned matter. Ms. Kobylevsky is leaving the employment of Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP. The firm of Kaplan Foz Kilsheimer LLP will continue to serve as counsel for Co-Lead Plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/18/2013) (rsh)
June 14, 2013 Filing 443 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Irina Kobylevsky. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Kobylevsky, Irina)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 4/17/2013 re: We represent defendant Fannie Mae and we write on behalf of all parties to the above captioned actions to request an adjournment of the status conference currently scheduled for 5:00 p.m. on April 24, 2013. At this time, the parties do not have any disputes to report to the Court. For the Court 's convenience, brief summaries of the status of each of the matters is set forth below. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned " sine die," The parties are directed to submit a status report by August 1, 2013. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/18/2013) (rsh)
March 27, 2013 CALENDAR ENTRY **DATE CHANGE**: Status Conference scheduled to go forward on Wednesday, April 24, 2013 @ 05:00 PM (**NOT 4/10/13 PM**) in Courtroom 11-D, before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. Reason for date change: ongoing trial before Judge Crotty. Requests for adjournment of the conference will be considered if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with the Judge Crotty's Individual Practices (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(mov)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 441 SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING THE SEC'S PRODUCTION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS FROM THE CUSTODY OR CONTROL OF FANNIE MAE THAT FHFA CONTENDS ARE SUBJECT TO THE EXAMINATION PRIVILEGE... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/23/2013) (rjm)
January 17, 2013 Filing 440 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: David P. Staubitz, hereby respectfully withdraw my appearance as counsel for defendant Enrico Dallavecchia and request removal from service of any further pleadings in connection with the above captioned matter. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/17/2013) (js)
January 17, 2013 Filing 439 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: David P. Staubitz, hereby respectfully withdraw my appearance as counsel for defendant Enrico Dallavecchia and request removal from service of any further pleadings in connection with the above captioned matter. The undersigned is no longer employed by or otherwise affiliated with Deehert LLP., counsel of record for defendant. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(js)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting # 436 Motion for David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 437 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties in the Consolidated Securities Action and the ERISA Action do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c).The Consolidated Securities Action and the ERISA Action are to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings in the Consolidated Securities Action or the ERISA Action may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Motions due by 2/13/2015. Responses due by 4/13/2015 Replies due by 5/29/2015. Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2014. Expert Discovery due by 12/2/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2013 at 04:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/13/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(js) Modified on 11/13/2012 (js).
November 13, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. # 436 MOTION for David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7969114. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 12, 2012 Filing 436 MOTION for David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7969114. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit - New Jersey Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stanoch, David)
November 5, 2012 Filing 435 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh dated 11/2/2012 re: Request to extend time to file the proposed case management plan. ENDORSEMENT: The requested extension is granted, & the November 7 conference is adjourned to November 14, 2012 at 4:15 PM. (Status Conference reset for 11/14/2012 at 04:15 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/5/2012) (cd)
November 5, 2012 Filing 434 ANSWER to # 400 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd.(Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2012 Filing 433 ANSWER to # 400 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia.(Gonzalez, Hector)
October 29, 2012 Filing 432 ANSWER to # 348 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Walsh, Michael)
October 29, 2012 Filing 431 ANSWER to # 400 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Walsh, Michael)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER: In light of the Court's August 30, 2012 order in In re Fannie Mae 2008 Sec. Litig.,No. 08 Civ. 7831 (PAC), the Court's October 22, 2012 order in In re Fannie Mae 2008 ERISA Litig., No. 09 Civ. 1350 (PAC), the Plaintiffs and Defendants in the ERISA and Securities Litigations are directed to confer to schedule a Civil Case Management Plan. The plan should be submitted by Friday November 2, 2012. If there are any disputes, the parties are to highlight the disputes and submit to the Court by Monday, November 5, 2012. The Court will hold a conference on Wednesday, November 7, 2012 at 3:15 PM in Courtroom 20C to resolve any remaining disputes. ( Status Conference set for 11/7/2012 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(js)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION: Accordingly, CIS and Smith's motions for reconsideration are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the following motions: 09 MD 2013 Dkt. No 156; 09 Civ. 6102 Ok!. No 128; and 10 Civ.2781 Dkt. No 88. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(cd)
October 10, 2012 Filing 428 Letter addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 10/5/12 re: Counsel for defendant Fannie Mae proposes that the parties begin in the process of meeting and conferring regarding a revised proposed case management plan and attempt to submit one to the Court expeditiously. (mro)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Frederic S. Fox, Louis Gottlieb and Glan DeValerio dated October 9, 2012 re: We request that the Court grant Lead Plaintiffs leave to appear at the October 10th S.E.C Action hearing and be heard.. ENDORSEMENT: Co-Lead plaintiffs may attend the conference as observers only. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on October 9, 2012) (mov)
October 9, 2012 Filing 426 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 7/18/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 9, 2012 Filing 425 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Hearing held on 7/18/2012 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 11, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Enrico Dallavecchia answer due 11/5/2012; Fannie Mae answer due 10/29/2012; Daniel Mudd answer due 11/5/2012; Daniel H. Mudd answer due 11/5/2012. (jfe)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 9/10/2012 re: Fannie Mae seeks a 45-day enlargement of time to October 29, 2012 to file its answers to the complaints. Defendants Mudd and Dallavecchia seek an additional week, to November 5, 2012, to file their answers to the Complaints. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(jfe)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 423 OPINION & ORDER: To summarize the Courts holdings:. Defendants motions to strike are DENIED;. FNMA, Mudd, and Dallavecchias motions to dismiss the Class Actions, Smiths, and CISs Section 10(b), Rule 10b-5 and Section 20(a) claims premised on FNMAs subprime and Alt-A exposure disclosures are DENIED;. FNMA, Mudd, and Dallavecchias motions to dismiss CISs Section 10(b), Rule 10b-5 and Section 20(a) claims premised on FNMAs core capital financials are GRANTED;. FNMA, Mudd, and Dallavecchias motions to dismiss Smiths and CISs Section 10(b), Rule 10b-5 and Section 20(a) claims premised on FNMAs risk management disclosures are DENIED; FNMA, Mudd, and Dallavecchias motions to dismiss all state law claims as against them under SLUSA are GRANTED;. Levin and Swads motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction are GRANTED; Goldmans motion to dismiss Liberty's complaint in its entirety is GRANTED; The Smith Underwriters motion to dismiss Smiths negligent misrepresentation claims is GRANTED; and. The CIS Underwriters motion to dismiss CISs state law claims against them is GRANTED. The Class Action, Smith and CISs federal securities law claims against FNMA, Mudd, and Dallavecchia regarding FNMAs subprime and Alt-A exposure disclosures and risk management controls can proceed. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the following motions: 08 Civ. 7831 Dkt. Nos. 353,355,357, 359,362, 365, 368,370,372, 377, 378,380, 382; 09 Civ. 6102 Dkt. Nos 83, 85, 88, 90, 93, 97, 98; 10 Civ. 2781 Dkt. Nos. 57, 60, 61, 67, 68; and 10 Civ. 9184 Dkt. No. 17. As all of Liberty's claims have been dismissed, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the 10 Civ. 9184 case. The Clerk of Court is further directed to dismiss the following defendants from the 09 Civ. 6102 action: Levin, Swad, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC and Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. The Clerk of Court is directed to dismiss the following defendants from the 10 Civ. 2781 action: Bane of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, JPMorgan Securities LLC (f/k/a JPMorgan Securities, Inc.), JPMorgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (f/k/a Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated), and UBS Securities LLC. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 8/30/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC, 1:10-cv-09184-PAC(pl) Modified on 8/30/2012 (pl).
August 23, 2012 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number # 424 TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (laq)
August 6, 2012 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number # 423 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (laq)
August 6, 2012 Filing 422 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 7/18/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 6, 2012 Filing 421 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 7/18/2012 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 18, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Oral Argument held on 7/18/2012 re: Motions to Dismiss. Ruling pending. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlowski & Michael McDaniel) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC, 1:10-cv-09184-PAC(mov)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER: The Court sets the following agenda for the July 18, 2012 oral argument in the above captioned cases. Beginning at 11:00 a.m., the Court will hear argument on all claims and motions relating to Fannie's subprime and Alt-A exposure, as raised through the SEC enforcement action and in the private securities actions. The Court will then hear argument on all other federal and state law claims raised in the private securities actions. The Court anticipates that all arguments relating to the various securities actions will conclude by 1:00 p.m. If additional time is needed, then argument in the securities actions will resume at 2:00 p.m. Barring any delays in the securities cases, the Court will hear argument regarding the ERISA action at 2:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(mro)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 7/10/12 re: Counsel for the defendants requests that the Court adjourn the oral argument in the ERISA action scheduled for 7/18/12 at 11 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: The request for an enlargement of the oral argument in the ERISA cases is DENIED. The argument will proceed as scheduled. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(mro)
June 18, 2012 Filing 418 DECLARATION of Craig S. Waldman in Support re: # 417 REPLY MEMORANDUM and in Support re: # 370 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Banc Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Waldman, Craig)
June 18, 2012 Filing 417 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 370 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Banc Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
June 18, 2012 Filing 416 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 370 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & CO.. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
June 18, 2012 Filing 415 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 370 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
June 18, 2012 Filing 414 DECLARATION of Michael J. Walsh, Jr. in Support re: (88 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 372 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the CIS Second Amended Complaint ., (368 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 60 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Smith Second Amended Complaint ., (359 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28, 44-52)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
June 18, 2012 Filing 413 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (97 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 73 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC, 67 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC, 377 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaints .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association Benefit Plans Committee, Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
June 18, 2012 Filing 412 NOTICE of Reply in Support of Fannie Mae's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Fannie Mae's Motion to Dismiss re: (129 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
June 18, 2012 Filing 411 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (368 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 60 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Smith Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
June 18, 2012 Filing 410 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (88 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 372 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the CIS Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
June 18, 2012 Filing 409 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 359 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Walsh, Michael)
June 18, 2012 Filing 408 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 378 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff CIS's Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel Mudd, Daniel H. Mudd. (Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2012 Filing 407 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Rotenberg in Support re: # 380 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Smith's Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel Mudd, Daniel H. Mudd. (Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2012 Filing 406 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 380 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Smith's Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel Mudd, Daniel H. Mudd. (Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2012 Filing 405 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Rotenberg in Support re: # 382 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel Mudd, Daniel H. Mudd. (Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2012 Filing 404 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 382 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel Mudd, Daniel H. Mudd. (Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2012 Filing 403 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 355 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Robert J. Levin. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberg, Alejandro)
June 18, 2012 Filing 402 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 353 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Stephen M. Swad. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tuttle, Jonathan)
June 18, 2012 Filing 401 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 357 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Levander, Andrew)
June 6, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-E-MAIL PDF. ***The Original PDF provided was too large. Please note that the Court cannot accept PDFs over 4.0 MB. E-MAIL the PDF for Document # 400 Amended Complaint,, to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (mro)
May 21, 2012 Filing 399 DECLARATION of Daniel E. Barenbaum in Opposition re: # 377 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaints ., # 357 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint ., # 382 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint ., # 359 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH)(Barenbaum, Daniel)
May 21, 2012 Filing 398 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 376 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) FANNIE MAE'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Barenbaum, Daniel)
May 21, 2012 Filing 397 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 377 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaints .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Barenbaum, Daniel)
May 21, 2012 Filing 396 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 357 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint . (Motion by Enrico Dallavecchia) . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Barenbaum, Daniel)
May 21, 2012 Filing 395 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 382 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Barenbaum, Daniel)
May 21, 2012 Filing 394 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 359 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Barenbaum, Daniel)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeff G. Hammel dated 4/26/12 re: Latham & Watkins LLP requests permission to withdraw as counsel for defendants Fannie Mae, Herbert M. Allison, Stephen B. Ashley, Louis J. Freeb, Brenda J. Gaines, Bridget A. Macaskill, Dennis R. Beresford, David H. Sidwell, Greg C. Smith, Egbert L. J. Perry, Jonathan Plutzik, Michael J. Williams, Judith C. Dunn, and Linda K. Knight. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/30/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(mro)
April 19, 2012 Filing 400 SECOND AMENDED JOINT CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Enrico Dallavecchia, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association, Daniel H. Mudd with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"), Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). (This document was previously filed under seal in envelope #349 and unsealed on 4/19/2012.) (Received for docketing on 6/6/2012.)(mro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2012: # 1 Second Amended Complaint part 2) (ama).
April 19, 2012 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: # 392 Endorsed Letter to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (ft)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Frederic S. Fox, Jonathan M. Plasse, and Glen DeValerio dated 4/17/2012 re: Counsel for the Lead Plaintiffs write to request that the Court unseal the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed March 2, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/19/2012) (ft)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER: The defendants in the SEC action have also filed motions to dismiss. In order to align the briefing schedules between the various cases, the Court modifies the briefing schedule in the above caption cases as follows: plaintiffs' opposition briefs are now due on May 21, 2012; defendants' reply briefs are due on June 18, 2012. This schedule applies equally to any motions to strike filed in the above captioned cases. Oral argument on the motions, which had been scheduled for June 11, 2012, will now be held on July 18, 2012, at 11:00 a.m. Additionally, the Court has received and reviewed the securities class action lead plaintiffs' letter, date April 11, 2012, requesting that the Court strike portions of defendants Mudd and Dallavecchia's briefs that incorporate by reference arguments made in other motions to dismiss. The Court has also received and reviewed defendants Dallavecchia and Mudd's responses, dated April 12 and 16, 2012, respectively. Plaintiffs' request to strike those portions of the defendants' motions is denied, but the securities class action plaintiffs are granted an extra five pages for their opposition brief. ( Oral Argument set for 7/18/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Crotty.), Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (124 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 368 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 60 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Smith Second Amended Complaint ., (126 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 88 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 372 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the CIS Second Amended Complaint ., (85 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (90 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (98 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (83 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (93 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss., (378 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff CIS's Second Amended Complaint ., (359 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint ., (362 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (353 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (355 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss., (380 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Smith's Second Amended Complaint ., (382 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint ., (370 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (365 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (357 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint ., (66 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss and Strike the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ., (65 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ., (22 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint ., (20 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint ., (69 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ., (24 in 1:09-cv-01350-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint ., (68 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (61 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (19 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ., (28 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Edward Smith's Complaint (filed in 08-cv-07831 07/11/2011) ., (24 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss., (22 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the CIS and Smith Amended Complaints ., (57 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (38 in 1:10-cv-09184-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint ., (17 in 1:10-cv-09184-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . :( Responses due by 5/21/2012, Replies due by 6/18/2012.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/18/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(jfe)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Joseph H. Meltzer dated 4/11/12 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs requests leave to file their opposition to the BPC defendants' motion to strike, together with plaintiffs' oppositions to the pending motions to dismiss, on 5/4/12. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered.( Responses due by 5/4/2012) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/13/2012) (mro)
April 5, 2012 Filing 389 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Rotenberg in Support re: # 382 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10 to the Declaration of Jeffrey D. Rotenberg, # 2 Exhibit 11-16 to the Declaration of Jeffrey D. Rotenberg)(Anklam, James)
April 5, 2012 Filing 388 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 382 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Anklam, James)
April 5, 2012 Filing 387 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Rotenberg in Support re: # 380 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Smith's Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Anklam, James)
April 5, 2012 Filing 386 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 380 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Smith's Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Anklam, James)
April 5, 2012 Filing 385 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Rotenberg in Support re: # 378 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff CIS's Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Anklam, James)
April 5, 2012 Filing 384 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 378 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff CIS's Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Anklam, James)
April 5, 2012 Filing 383 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #388) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 382 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeff Rotenberg in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10 to Rotenberg Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 11-16 to Rotenberg Declaration)(Anklam, James) Modified on 4/6/2012 (ldi).
April 5, 2012 Filing 382 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint . Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd.(Anklam, James)
April 5, 2012 Filing 381 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #386) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 380 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Smith's Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey D. Rotenberg in Support of Daniel Mudd's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Smith) (with Ex. 1))(Anklam, James) Modified on 4/6/2012 (ldi).
April 5, 2012 Filing 380 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Smith's Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd.(Anklam, James)
April 4, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney James E. Anklam to RE-FILE Document # 379 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
April 4, 2012 Filing 379 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 378 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff CIS's Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey D. Rotenberg in Support of Daniel Mudd's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (CIS) (with Ex. 1))(Anklam, James) Modified on 4/5/2012 (ldi).
April 4, 2012 Filing 378 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff CIS's Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd.(Anklam, James)
April 4, 2012 Filing 377 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaints . Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association Benefit Plans Committee, Federal National Mortgage Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 376 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice re: (125 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 369 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 62 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, (126 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 88 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 372 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the CIS Second Amended Complaint ., (375 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 95 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 128 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 65 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) Declaration in Support of Motion,,, (89 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 374 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 127 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, (124 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 368 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 60 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Smith Second Amended Complaint ., (361 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, (359 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 375 DECLARATION of Michael J. Walsh, Jr. in Support re: (124 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 368 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 60 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Smith Second Amended Complaint ., (372 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 126 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 88 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the CIS Second Amended Complaint ., (359 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibit 10-21, # 5 Exhibit 22, # 6 Exhibit 23-33, # 7 Exhibit 34-43)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 374 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (126 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 88 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 372 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the CIS Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 373 DECLARATION of Craig S. Waldman in Support re: # 370 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Waldman, Craig)
April 4, 2012 Filing 372 MOTION to Dismiss the CIS Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 371 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 370 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
April 4, 2012 Filing 370 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC.(Youngwood, Jonathan)
April 4, 2012 Filing 369 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (124 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 368 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 60 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss the Smith Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 368 MOTION to Dismiss the Smith Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 367 DECLARATION of Craig S. Waldman in Support re: # 365 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Banc Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Waldman, Craig)
April 4, 2012 Filing 366 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 365 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Banc Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
April 4, 2012 Filing 365 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Banc of America Securities LLC, Deutsche Banc Securities Inc., JP Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, UBS Securities LLC.(Youngwood, Jonathan)
April 4, 2012 Filing 364 DECLARATION of Craig S. Waldman in Support re: # 362 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit C (Part 2 of 2), # 5 Exhibit D (Part 1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit D (Part 2 of 2), # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N (Part 1 of 5), # 17 Exhibit N (Part 2 of 5), # 18 Exhibit N (Part 3 of 5), # 19 Exhibit N (Part 4 of 5), # 20 Exhibit N (Part 5 of 5), # 21 Exhibit O)(Waldman, Craig)
April 4, 2012 Filing 363 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 362 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & CO.. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
April 4, 2012 Filing 362 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Goldman Sachs & CO..(Youngwood, Jonathan)
April 4, 2012 Filing 361 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 359 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Walsh, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 360 DECLARATION of Hector Gonzalez in Support re: # 357 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Levander, Andrew)
April 4, 2012 Filing 359 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint . Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Walsh, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 358 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 357 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Levander, Andrew)
April 4, 2012 Filing 357 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Joint Consolidated Class Action Complaint . Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia.(Levander, Andrew)
April 4, 2012 Filing 356 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 355 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Robert J. Levin. (Rosenberg, Alejandro)
April 4, 2012 Filing 355 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Robert J. Levin. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberg, Alejandro)
April 4, 2012 Filing 354 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 353 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . / Memorandum of Law in Support of Stephen M. Swad's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Stephen M. Swad. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tuttle, Jonathan)
April 4, 2012 Filing 353 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Stephen M. Swad. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tuttle, Jonathan)
April 2, 2012 Filing 352 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr dated 3/29/2012 re: Counsel respectfully request permission for Fannie Mae to file a memorandum of law of up to 50 pages in support of its motion to dismiss the second amended joint consolidated class action complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Being brief is a virtue. The Court denies the request, but will allow a brief of up to 35 pages. Plaintiffs response will bit be enlarged. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/2/2012) (jfe)
March 22, 2012 Filing 351 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/1/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2012 Filing 350 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 2/1/2012 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tara Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 8, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RESEND PDF. PDF originally sent was too large. Note to Attorney Jonathan M. Plasse for noncompliance with Section 14.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document # 349 Amended Complaint, to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (mro)
March 2, 2012 Filing 349 SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Enrico Dallavecchia, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Fannie Mae, Daniel H. Mudd with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM").(mro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2012: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4) (tro).
March 2, 2012 Filing 348 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Enrico Dallavecchia, Robert J. Levin, Fannie Mae, Daniel H. Mudd, Stephen M. Swad, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.(lmb)
March 2, 2012 Filing 347 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
February 17, 2012 Filing 346 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/1/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 17, 2012 Filing 345 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 2/1/2012 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tara Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 7, 2012 Filing 344 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/1/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 7, 2012 Filing 343 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 2/1/2012 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tara Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference held on February 1, 2012, plaintiffs are authorized to file amended complaints. See transcript for complete details. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(rjm)
February 1, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 2/1/2012. REMARK: Amended complaints to be filed by 03/02/12. The schedule on the motions to dismiss the amended complaints is as follows: Motions: 04/04/12, Response: 05/04/12, Reply: 05/18/12. Oral argument will go forward on Monday, June 11, 2012 at 4:00 PM. The Court will confer with Judge Andrew L. Carter (SDNY) with respect to the recent letter submitted in regards to the reassignment 11 Civ. 9202 (ALC) to Judge Crotty. All current pending motions to dismiss are terminated as moot. The February 8 & 10 argument dates are marked off the calendar. See transcript for details (Court Reporter: Tara Jones). Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(mov)
January 31, 2012 Calendar Entry **COURTROOM CHANGE** : Pretrial Conference set to go forward on Wednesday, February 1, 2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B (**NOT 20C**) before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(mov)
January 27, 2012 Filing 341 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Paul Staubitz on behalf of Enrico Dallavecchia Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(Staubitz, David)
January 27, 2012 Filing 340 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hector Gonzalez on behalf of Enrico Dallavecchia Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(Gonzalez, Hector)
January 27, 2012 Filing 339 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Levander on behalf of Enrico Dallavecchia Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(Levander, Andrew)
January 25, 2012 Filing 338 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Price Torres on behalf of Goldman Sachs & CO., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. (Torres, Shannon)
January 25, 2012 Filing 337 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan K. Youngwood on behalf of Goldman Sachs & CO., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. (Youngwood, Jonathan)
January 23, 2012 Calendar Entry: A pretrial conference is scheduled to go forward on Wednesday, February 1, 2012 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 20C. The conference will cover the recent letters submitted as well as the status of the motions to dismiss in light of the plaintiffs intention on amending the complaint. Any requests for adjournment of this conference shall be made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Judge Crotty's Individual Practices (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(mov)
January 23, 2012 Calendar Entry: A pretrial conference is scheduled to go forward on Wednesday, February 1, 2012 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 20C. The conference will cover the recent letters submitted as well as the status of the motions to dismiss in light of the plaintiffs intention on amending the complaint. Any requests for adjournment of this conference shall be made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Judge Crotty's Individual Practices (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(mov)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 1/12/2012 re: Counsel for the defendant requests to adjourn the remaining deadlines in the Second Amended Case Management Plan including Defendants' opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' class certification motions and Lead Plaintiffs' replies. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/13/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC (ft)
January 11, 2012 Filing 335 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alejandro Gabriel Rosenberg on behalf of Robert J. Levin. New Address: Steptoe & Johnson, LLP, 1114 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, United States of America 10036, 212-506-3900. (Rosenberg, Alejandro)
December 7, 2011 Filing 334 Letter addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David W. Fassett dated 12/2/2011 re: Counsel writes to inform the Court that FHFA has decided not to file a motion to stay at the present time. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (ab)
December 6, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 2/10/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 26A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(rjm)
December 6, 2011 Filing 333 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 12/1/2011 re: We represent defendant Fannie Mae in this litigation and write on behalf of the current and former Fannie Mae officers and directors named in the above-captioned actions to respectfully request that the Court reschedule the oral arguments on all outstanding motions to dismiss the above-captioned actions. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The oral argument on the three pending motions to dismiss the consolidated ERlSA action (09-cv-1350) will go forward on Wednesday, February 8, 2012 at 04:45PM in Courtroom 26A. The oral argument on the ten pending motions to dismiss the Smith, CIS and Liberty Mutual cases (08-cv-7831) is adjourned to Friday, February 10, 2012 at 1:30PM in Courtroom 26A. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/6/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01350-PAC(rjm)
November 17, 2011 Filing 332 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Frederick S. Fox; Jonathan M. Plasse and Glen DeValerio dated November 16, 2011 re: Lead Plaintiffs' counsel writes to supplemental their 10/17/2011 letter, which was written pursuant to Rule 3(D) of Your Honor's Individual Practices and which responded to Defendant Federal Housing Finance Agency's ("FHFA") 10/12/2011 letter-request for a pre-motion conference concerning FHFA's anticipation motion for an indefinite stay of all proceedings in this action. ENDORSEMENT: It would be strange if Federal Housing Finance Agency ('FHFA") could adopt a rule frustrating the payment of claims in this proceeding; but FHFA is entitled to make a motion, however unlikely it will be granted. There is no need for a pre-motion conference. The parties should meet and confer and submit a proposed schedule, but FHFA's motion should be made no later than Friday, 12/2/2011. In the meantime, lest there be any doubt, there is NO stay of any and all ongoing discovery. ( Motions due by 12/2/2011.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/17/2011) (ae)
November 10, 2011 Calendar Entry: Oral Argument on the pending Motions to Dismiss will go forward on Wednesday, January 4, 2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. Any requests for adjournment shall be made in writing on or before Thursday, December 1, 2011 at 5:00 PM, and otherwise in accordance with Judge Crotty's Individual Practices.---A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY---(By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(mov)
November 10, 2011 Calendar Entry: Oral Argument on the pending Motions to Dismiss will go forward on Wednesday, January 4, 2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. Any requests for adjournment shall be made in writing on or before Thursday, December 1, 2011 at 5:00 PM, and otherwise in accordance with Judge Crotty's Individual Practices.---A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY---(By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(mov)
October 31, 2011 Filing 331 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph J. Aronica on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency (Aronica, Joseph)
October 13, 2011 Filing 330 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kelly Bain Kramer on behalf of Enrico Dallavecchia. New Address: Mayer Brown, LLP, 1999 K Street, NW, Washington, DC, 20006, 202-263-3300. (Kramer, Kelly)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael J. Walsh, Jr. dated 10/7/11 re: The parties request that the deadline for Defendants to oppose Lead Plaintiffs' class certification motions be extended to January 13, 2012, and that the time for Lead Plaintiffs to file replies in support of class certification be extended to March 22, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Responses due by 1/13/2012. Replies due by 3/22/2012.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/11/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(rjm)
September 26, 2011 Filing 328 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/3/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 26, 2011 Filing 327 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/3/2011 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Tape Number: 8/3/11. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 15, 2011 Filing 326 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 282 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Kramer, Kelly)
September 15, 2011 Filing 325 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (24 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC, 291 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 47 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 81 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
September 15, 2011 Filing 324 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 288 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Robert J. Levin. (Rosenberg, Alejandro)
September 15, 2011 Filing 323 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 285 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Edward Smith's Complaint .. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Kramer, Kelly)
September 15, 2011 Filing 322 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 280 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Stephen M. Swad. (Tuttle, Jonathan)
September 1, 2011 Filing 321 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Brendan Bruce on behalf of Fannie Mae (Bruce, Eric)
August 25, 2011 Filing 320 AFFIRMATION of Andrew J. Frisch in Opposition re: # 288 MOTION to Dismiss., # 282 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ., # 280 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frisch, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 Filing 319 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 288 MOTION to Dismiss., # 282 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ., # 280 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 Filing 318 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 280 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 Filing 317 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 288 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 Filing 316 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 282 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 Filing 315 RESPONSE in Opposition re: # 291 MOTION to Dismiss. Objection to Request for Judicial Notice of Exhibit 17 . Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 Filing 314 RESPONSE in Opposition re: # 291 MOTION to Dismiss. Objection to Exhibit 17 of Declaration of Michael J. Walsh, Jr. . Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 Filing 313 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew J. Frisch in Opposition re: # 291 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frisch, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 Filing 312 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 291 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
August 25, 2011 Filing 311 DECLARATION of Eric Kirkpatrick in Opposition re: # 291 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 2), # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23 (Part 1 of 12), # 25 Exhibit 23 (Part 2 of 12), # 26 Exhibit 23 (Part 3 of 12), # 27 Exhibit 23 (Part 4 of 12), # 28 Exhibit 23 (Part 5 of 12), # 29 Exhibit 23 (Part 6 of 12), # 30 Exhibit 23 (Part 7 of 12), # 31 Exhibit 23 (Part 8 of 12), # 32 Exhibit 23 (Part 9 of 12), # 33 Exhibit 23 (Part 10 of 12), # 34 Exhibit 23 (Part 11 of 12), # 35 Exhibit 23 (Part 12 of 12), # 36 Exhibit 24, # 37 Exhibit 25, # 38 Exhibit 26, # 39 Errata 27, # 40 Exhibit 28 (Part 1 of 2), # 41 Exhibit 28 (Part 2 of 2))(Frisch, Andrew)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER: Lead plaintiffs (see Letter of July 1, 2011) and Fannie Mae (see letter of July 7, 2011) are in dispute concerning the scope of discovery permissible on the remaining claim in this action after the Courts Opinion and Order, dated September 30, 2010. At the most general level, the Court held that Fannie Maes risk management and controls were insufficient to evaluate the risks of subprime and Alt-A Mortgages; and that Fannie Mae misinformed the market concerning its risk management capabilities. (See Opinion and Order of September 30, 2010, pg. 22-27). The Court heard oral argument on August 3, 2011 concerning the discovery dispute. We may take as a given that lead plaintiffs are not entitled to discovery on claims which have been dismissed, and their discovery is limited to the claim remaining in the lawsuit. As counsel for lead plaintiffs conceded at the August 3, 2011 oral argument: Let me make one thing clear to the extent we havent made it clear, is that we are not seeking documents beyond the scope of whats in the Courts order on pages 22-26. In other words, we fully understand [with respect to dismissed claims]... we are not seeking discovery on that. We are only seeking discovery for what your Honor upheld, which is on pages 22 to 26. (pg 4 ll 25 pg 5 ll 11). Lead plaintiffs counsels concession applies to both the First and Second set of document requests. While discovery is limited to the remaining claim dealing with risk management, lead plaintiffs are entitled to discovery as full as permitted by law and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Discovery cannot be limited to the events surrounding Mr. Dallavecchias several emails. Nor can risk management be limited by the term credit risk management, as Fannie Mae suggests, so that it excludes other risks related to guarantee fees; underwriting standards or losses sustained by Fannie Mae relating to subprime and Alt-A Mortgages. Having sustained lead plaintiffs claims on risk management, lead plaintiffs are entitled to discovery, including all events, occurrences and transactions covered by Fannie Maes risk management policiesor, in the exercise of reasonable prudence, should have been covered by such policies. Thus, it would include risks arising out of or occurring on transactions with loan losses and creating reserves for such losses, or for creating reserves for losses on guarantees. Fannie Mae believes that its losses were caused by a once in a century meltdown in the housing finance sector. It argues that lead plaintiffs have failed to explain how they will show that something other than the global financial crisis caused Fannie Maes stock price to drop in September (Fannie Mae letter of July 7, 2011, pg. 3). But this argument puts the cart before the horse; lead plaintiffs are not required to disprove defendants defense as a condition precedent to discovery. Rather, lead plaintiff is allowed to seek documents and related discovery on its theory of liability which is still viable. Lead plaintiffs may discover documents concerning deficient risk policies and procedures, including documents concerning risk and losses, underwriting guidelines, guarantee fees, institutional counter-party risk and risk model. In short, lead plaintiffs may discover Fannie Maes risk management policies, what the policies covered and how; further, they are entitled to discovery on what the risk management policy should have covered, including managements consideration of how, when and why to apply appropriate standards for risk management. Given this guidance, the parties should meet and confer concerning any remaining discovery disputes. The guiding beacon, however, is that lead plaintiffs are entitled to discovery on the remaining viable claim in this action concerning Fannie Maes risk management policy, procedures and practices, as applied to the risks confronting Fannie Man. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on August 19, 2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(mov)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting # 278 Motion for Erik L. Kitchen to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Robert J. Levin. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 8/19/2011) (lmb) Modified on 8/19/2011 (lmb).
August 15, 2011 Filing 308 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/3/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 15, 2011 Filing 307 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/3/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 9, 2011 Filing 306 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/3/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 9, 2011 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/3/2011 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 3, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 8/3/2011. REMARK: The Court will rule on the letters discussed at this conference shortly after receiving the transcript of this proceeding. See transcript for details. Court Reporter: Alena Lynch. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(mov)
August 2, 2011 Calendar Entry **REMINDER**: Pre-Motion Conference to discuss lead plaintiff's letter dated July 1, 2011 and Fannie Mae's response dated July 7, 2011 is set to go forward on Wednesday, August 3, 2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy).(mov)
July 28, 2011 Filing 304 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Olney, Eric)
July 21, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 278 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 06/29/2011, Receipt Number 10407. (jd)
July 18, 2011 Filing 303 DECLARATION of JONATHAN M. PLASSE in Support re: (21 in 1:09-cv-01351-PAC, 61 in 1:08-cv-08008-PAC, 48 in 1:08-cv-08676-PAC, 53 in 1:08-cv-08353-PAC, 66 in 1:08-cv-08547-PAC, 72 in 1:08-cv-08609-PAC, 21 in 1:09-cv-01367-PAC, 73 in 1:08-cv-08491-PAC, 68 in 1:08-cv-08551-PAC, 301 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 77 in 1:08-cv-08519-PAC, 45 in 1:08-cv-09650-PAC, 59 in 1:09-cv-01352-PAC, 69 in 1:08-cv-08488-PAC, 46 in 1:08-cv-09649-PAC, 75 in 1:08-cv-08096-PAC, 60 in 1:08-cv-07938-PAC, 54 in 1:08-cv-08520-PAC) MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF COMMON STOCK LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND CLASS COUNSEL .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(Plasse, Jonathan)
July 18, 2011 Filing 302 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (21 in 1:09-cv-01351-PAC, 72 in 1:08-cv-08609-PAC, 21 in 1:09-cv-01367-PAC, 73 in 1:08-cv-08491-PAC, 68 in 1:08-cv-08551-PAC, 61 in 1:08-cv-08008-PAC, 48 in 1:08-cv-08676-PAC, 301 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 77 in 1:08-cv-08519-PAC, 45 in 1:08-cv-09650-PAC, 59 in 1:09-cv-01352-PAC, 69 in 1:08-cv-08488-PAC, 46 in 1:08-cv-09649-PAC, 75 in 1:08-cv-08096-PAC, 60 in 1:08-cv-07938-PAC, 54 in 1:08-cv-08520-PAC, 53 in 1:08-cv-08353-PAC, 66 in 1:08-cv-08547-PAC) MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF COMMON STOCK LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND CLASS COUNSEL .. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(Plasse, Jonathan)
July 18, 2011 Filing 301 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF COMMON STOCK LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND CLASS COUNSEL . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM").Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(Plasse, Jonathan)
July 18, 2011 Filing 300 DECLARATION of Frederic S. Fox in Support re: (298 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 74 in 1:08-cv-08519-PAC, 66 in 1:08-cv-08488-PAC, 57 in 1:08-cv-07938-PAC, 45 in 1:08-cv-08676-PAC, 51 in 1:08-cv-08520-PAC, 50 in 1:08-cv-08353-PAC, 65 in 1:08-cv-08551-PAC, 43 in 1:08-cv-09649-PAC, 58 in 1:08-cv-08008-PAC, 63 in 1:08-cv-08547-PAC, 18 in 1:09-cv-01351-PAC, 70 in 1:08-cv-08491-PAC, 18 in 1:09-cv-01367-PAC, 69 in 1:08-cv-08609-PAC, 72 in 1:08-cv-08096-PAC, 42 in 1:08-cv-09650-PAC, 56 in 1:09-cv-01352-PAC) MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF PREFERRED STOCK LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE AND CLASS COUNSEL .. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(Fox, Frederic)
July 18, 2011 Filing 299 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (298 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 74 in 1:08-cv-08519-PAC, 66 in 1:08-cv-08488-PAC, 57 in 1:08-cv-07938-PAC, 45 in 1:08-cv-08676-PAC, 51 in 1:08-cv-08520-PAC, 50 in 1:08-cv-08353-PAC, 65 in 1:08-cv-08551-PAC, 43 in 1:08-cv-09649-PAC, 58 in 1:08-cv-08008-PAC, 63 in 1:08-cv-08547-PAC, 18 in 1:09-cv-01351-PAC, 70 in 1:08-cv-08491-PAC, 18 in 1:09-cv-01367-PAC, 69 in 1:08-cv-08609-PAC, 72 in 1:08-cv-08096-PAC, 42 in 1:08-cv-09650-PAC, 56 in 1:09-cv-01352-PAC) MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF PREFERRED STOCK LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE AND CLASS COUNSEL .. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(Fox, Frederic)
July 18, 2011 Filing 298 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF PREFERRED STOCK LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE AND CLASS COUNSEL . Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS").Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(Fox, Frederic)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 297 STIPULATED PRETRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/15/2011) (mro)
July 14, 2011 Filing 296 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alejandro Gabriel Rosenberg on behalf of Robert J. Levin. New Address: Steptoe & Johnson LLP, 750 Seventh Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10019, (212) 506-3900. (Rosenberg, Alejandro)
July 14, 2011 Calendar Entry: A Pre-Motion Conference to discuss lead plaintiff's letter dated July 1, 2011 and Fannie Mae's response dated July 7, 2011 is set to go forward on Wednesday, August 3, 2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. Any requests for adjournment shall be made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Judge Crotty's Individual Practices (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A Crotty from Daniel Barenbaum dated 7/8/11 re: Counsel for the lead plaintiffs request that the Court enter an order granting them leave to file two separate briefs on behalf of the independent classes. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/14/2011) (mro)
July 11, 2011 Filing 294 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice re: (24 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC, 291 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 47 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 81 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
July 11, 2011 Filing 293 DECLARATION of Michael J. Walsh, Jr. in Support re: (24 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC, 291 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 47 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 81 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 10-17)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
July 11, 2011 Filing 292 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (24 in 1:10-cv-02781-PAC, 291 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 47 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 81 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
July 11, 2011 Filing 291 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(Walsh, Michael)
July 11, 2011 Filing 290 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE served on all counsel of record on 7/11/2011. Document filed by Robert J. Levin. (Rosenberg, Alejandro)
July 11, 2011 Filing 289 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 288 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Robert J. Levin. (Rosenberg, Alejandro)
July 11, 2011 Filing 288 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Robert J. Levin.(Rosenberg, Alejandro)
July 11, 2011 Filing 287 DECLARATION of Kelly B. Kramer in Support re: # 285 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Edward Smith's Complaint .. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kramer, Kelly)
July 11, 2011 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 285 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Edward Smith's Complaint .. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Kramer, Kelly)
July 11, 2011 Filing 285 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Edward Smith's Complaint . Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia.(Kramer, Kelly)
July 11, 2011 Filing 284 DECLARATION of Kelly B. Kramer in Support re: # 282 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Kramer, Kelly)
July 11, 2011 Filing 283 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 282 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Kramer, Kelly)
July 11, 2011 Filing 282 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint . Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia.(Kramer, Kelly)
July 11, 2011 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 280 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Stephen M. Swad. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Certificate of Service)(Tuttle, Jonathan)
July 11, 2011 Filing 280 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Stephen M. Swad. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Certificate of Service)(Tuttle, Jonathan)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER: CIS specifically requested that it be excluded from the November 29, 2010 Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order so that it did not have to comply with pending deadlines. Now, CIS desires the ability to use the May 12, 2010 Second Amended Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order to its advantage. In these circumstances, this is inappropriate and its motion to participate in discovery is DENIED until the motion to dismiss is decided. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/5/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC(jfe)
June 29, 2011 Filing 278 MOTION for Erik L. Kitchen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Robert J. Levin.(pgu)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 277 STIPULATION AND ORDER, 1. Defendants' deadline to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in the CIS Action is extended to July 11, 2011. 2, If defendants file any motions to dismiss the amended complaint in the CIS Action, plaintiff's deadline to respond to any motion(s) to dismiss is forty. five (45) days after the last of such motions is filed and defendants shall file any replies in support of any motions to dismiss no later than twenty-one (21) days after plaintiff files its opposition papers. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/10/11) (pl)
May 31, 2011 Filing 276 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Enrico Dallavecchia waiver sent on 5/12/2011, answer due 7/11/2011. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
May 19, 2011 Filing 275 STIPULATION that Stephen B. Ashley was named as a defendant to plaintiff's original complaint in this action dated 5/13/09. This stipulation is made to confirm that Mr. Ashley is not named as a defendant in plaintiff's first amended complaint dated 5/11/11, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/19/11) (cd)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting # 272 Motion for John H. Sutter to Appear Pro Hac Vice for lead plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/19/11) (cd)
May 13, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 272 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 05/09/2011, Receipt Number 6196. (jd)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 273 SECOND AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER The Consolidated Securities Action is to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 7/18/2011, Responses due by 10/11/2011, Replies due by 12/20/2011, Discovery due by 5/18/2012. The next Case Management conference is scheduled for to be determined at a later date. The 10-6-11 PTC is marked off the calendar as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/12/11) (jmi)
May 11, 2011 Filing 271 NOTICE of First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
May 9, 2011 Filing 272 MOTION for John H. Sutter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS").(sjo)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER, Defendants' motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at docket numbers # 234 , # 236 , and # 239 . SO ORDERED. (Docketed in Case No. 09 MD 2013) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/11/2011) (lnl)
April 8, 2011 Filing 270 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE, Please take notice that, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 1.4, Agnes Dunogue, currently of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP, hereby respectfully requests that she be withdrawn ascounsel for defendants Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bane of America Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., FTN Financial Securities Corp., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets LLC and Wells Fargo Securities LLC in the above- captioned action and all actions consolidated therewith and/or related thereto. The undersigned is no longer associated with the law firm of Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, counsel for these defendants. Please therefore remove the undersigned from all CM/ECF notifications regarding the above-captioned action and all actions consolidated therewith and/or related thereto. Attorney Agnes Dunogue terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/8/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(pl)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER, that James Berger and the law firm of Paul, Hastings, Janofsky & Walker LLP are permitted to withdraw from the above captioned matter. The Clerk is directed to note such on the docket. Attorney James Evan Berger terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/30/2011) (lnl)
March 24, 2011 Filing 267 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James D. Wareham on behalf of Daniel Mudd. New Address: DLA Piper LLP (US), 500 Eighth Street, NW, Washington, DC, USA 20004, 202-799-4515. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(Wareham, James)
March 9, 2011 Filing 266 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL: The undersigned is mistakenly listed on the ECF docket as Counsel for Defendant, Federal Housing Finance Agency in the above-referenced matter. Neither my firm nor I represent Defendant, Federal Housing Finance Agency. Moreover, we have never filed a Notice of Appearance in this matter. For these reasons, kindly remove me and my firm, Littler Mendelson, P.C., as Defendant's counsel from the Electronic Notification System. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/9/2011) (jpo)
March 1, 2011 Filing 265 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Mary Gibbons Whipple, New Attorney: David W. Fassett, Address: Arseneault, Whipple, Fassett & Azzarello, LLP, 560 Main Street, Chatham, New Jersey, USA 07928, 973-635-3366. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Fassett, David)
February 23, 2011 Filing 264 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on November 16, 2009 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(mro)
February 22, 2011 Filing 263 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James E. Anklam on behalf of Daniel H. Mudd. New Address: DLA Piper LLP (US), 500 Eighth Street, NW, Washington, District of Columbia, USA 20004, 202-799-4514. (Anklam, James)
February 17, 2011 Filing 262 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey David Rotenberg on behalf of Daniel H. Mudd (Rotenberg, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 261 FIRST AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion for class certification due by 5/18/2011. Fact Discovery due by 3/19/2012, see document for other deadlines. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2011 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty. The 5/11/11 PTC is marked off the calendar. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/27/11) (cd)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER the Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, entered by this Court on 11/29/10, and the deadlines and timetables therein, do not apply to the Comprehensive Investment Services action. With respect to that action, the Court's 10/26/10 order remains in effect. The Clerk of Court shall terminate doc #257 in 08 cv 7831. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/27/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC(cd)
January 26, 2011 Filing 259 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joshua Lon Crowell on behalf of Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). New Address: Labaton Sucharow LLP, 140 Broadway, New York, New York, United States 10005, (212) 907-0854. (Crowell, Joshua)
January 18, 2011 Filing 258 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 257 MOTION Clarification of the Court's November 29, 2010 order governing case management and scheduling .. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
January 18, 2011 Filing 257 MOTION Clarification of the Court's November 29, 2010 order governing case management and scheduling . Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frisch, Andrew)
January 7, 2011 Filing 256 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. Related document: # 102 Amended Complaint, filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS").(Kramer, Kelly)
January 7, 2011 Filing 255 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. Related document: # 102 Amended Complaint, filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS").(Berger, James)
December 31, 2010 Filing 254 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Related document: # 102 Amended Complaint, filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS").(Walsh, Michael)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey W. Kilduff dated 12/9/10 re: Fannie Mae seeks an enlargement of time to December 31, 2010 to file its answer. Defendants Mudd and Dellavecchia seek an enlargement of time to 1/7/11 to file their answers. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Enrico Dallavecchia answer due 1/7/2011; Fannie Mae answer due 12/31/2010; Daniel H. Mudd answer due 1/7/2011. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/10/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(rjm)
December 9, 2010 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 250 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 11/15/2010, Receipt Number 921300. (jd)
November 29, 2010 Filing 252 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The parties in the Consolidated Securities Action do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge. The Consolidated Securities Action is to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 2/18/2011. Deposition due by 10/28/2011. Discovery due by 12/19/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2011 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/29/2010) (jpo)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Justin N. Saif is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Lead Plaintiffs in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. granting # 250 Motion for Justin N. Saif to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/19/10) (rjm)
November 12, 2010 Filing 250 MOTION for Justin N. Saif to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS").(mro)
November 12, 2010 Filing 249 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 236 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Berger, James)
November 12, 2010 Filing 248 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 234 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Walsh, Michael)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 247 STIPULATION AND ORDER No response to the complaint in the Smith Action shall be required from any defendant while the Motions for Reconsideration are pending. Plaintiff may, but shall not be required to, file an amended complaint in the Smith Action on or before the date that is 30 days after entry of an order determining the Motions for Reconsideration, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/2/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(cd)
November 1, 2010 Filing 246 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 234 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., # 236 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,., # 239 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Attachments: # 1 Signatures)(Barenbaum, Daniel)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 STIPULATION AND ORDER that no response to the complaint in the CIS Action shall be required from any defendant while the Motion for Reconsideration are pending. Plaintiff may, but shall not be required to, file an amended complaint in the CIS Action on or before the date that is 30 days after entry of an order determining the Motions for Reconsideration, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/26/10) (cd)
October 15, 2010 Filing 244 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Lon Crowell on behalf of Boston Retirement Board (Crowell, Joshua)
October 15, 2010 Filing 243 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alberto Fonti on behalf of Boston Retirement Board (Fonti, Joseph)
October 15, 2010 Filing 242 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard T. Joffe on behalf of Boston Retirement Board (Joffe, Richard)
October 15, 2010 Filing 241 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan M. Plasse on behalf of Boston Retirement Board (Plasse, Jonathan)
October 14, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Enrico Dallavecchia answer due 12/13/2010; Fannie Mae answer due 12/13/2010; Daniel H. Mudd answer due 12/13/2010. (pl)
October 14, 2010 Filing 240 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 239 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Kramer, Kelly)
October 14, 2010 Filing 239 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia.(Kramer, Kelly)
October 14, 2010 Filing 238 DECLARATION of James E. Berger in Support re: # 236 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Berger, James)
October 14, 2010 Filing 237 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 236 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Berger, James)
October 14, 2010 Filing 236 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd.(Berger, James)
October 14, 2010 Filing 235 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 234 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Walsh, Michael)
October 14, 2010 Filing 234 MOTION for Reconsideration re; # 228 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Walsh, Michael)
October 14, 2010 Filing 233 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Lon Crowell on behalf of Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM") (Crowell, Joshua) Modified on 10/20/2010 (KA).
October 14, 2010 Filing 232 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alberto Fonti on behalf of Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM") (Fonti, Joseph) Modified on 10/20/2010 (KA).
October 14, 2010 Filing 231 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard T. Joffe on behalf of Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM") (Joffe, Richard) Modified on 10/20/2010 (KA).
October 14, 2010 Filing 230 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan M. Plasse on behalf of Boston Retirement Board, Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM") (Plasse, Jonathan) Modified on 10/20/2010 (KA).
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION AND ORDER, that Defendants shall answer the Complaint on or before December 13, 2010. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/14/10) (pl)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 228 OPINION & ORDER: #99514 CONCLUSION: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically: (1) With respect to Plaintiffs' claim against Fannie and the Individual Defendants for violations of Section 10(b) of the Exchange Act, 15 U.S.C. 78j(b), and SEC Rule 10b-5, 17 C.F.R. 240.10b-5, the Court: (a) GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss as to Plaintiffs' allegations regarding Fannies subprime and Alt-A mortgage exposure and financial reporting as to all Defendants;(b) DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss as to Plaintiffs' allegations regarding Fannies internal controls and risk management as to Fannie, Mudd, and Dallavecchia; (c) GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss as to Plaintiffs' allegations regarding Fannie's internal controls and risk management as to Swad and Blakely; and (2) With respect to Plaintiffs' claim against Deloitte for violations of Section 10(b) of the Exchange Act, 15 U.S.C. 78j(b), and SEC Rule 10b-5, 17 C.F.R. 240.10b-5, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss; and (3) With respect to Plaintiffs' claim against the Individual Defendants for control person liability under Section 20(a) of the Exchange Act, 15 U.S.C. 78t(a), the Court: (a) GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss as to Plaintiffs' allegations regarding Fannie's subprime and Alt-A mortgage exposure and financial reporting as to all the Individual Defendants; (b) DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss as to Plaintiffs' allegations regarding Fannie's internal controls and risk management as to Mudd and Dallavecchia; (c) GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss as to Plaintiffs' allegations regarding Fannie's internal controls and risk management as to Swad and Blakely; and The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at docket numbers 155, 156, 161, 163, and 167.(Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on September 30, 2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(mov) Modified on 10/4/2010 (ajc).
August 5, 2010 Filing 227 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Robert J. Levin. (Segal, Lenor)
August 5, 2010 Filing 226 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alejandro Gabriel Rosenberg on behalf of Robert J. Levin (Rosenberg, Alejandro)
August 3, 2010 Filing 225 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Irina Kobylevsky on behalf of Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). New Address: Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP, 850 Third Avenue, 14th Floor, New York, New York, 10022, 212-687-1980. (Kobylevsky, Irina)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER. The Motion for certification of the November 24, 2009 Remand Order for immediate interlocutory appeal is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate document number 194 in 08 Civ. 7831, and document number 43 in 09 Civ. 1352. denying (194) Motion for Certificate of Appealability in case 1:08-cv-07831-PAC; denying (43) Motion for Certificate of Appealability in case 1:09-cv-01352-PAC. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(rjm)
July 15, 2010 Filing 223 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Irina Kobylevsky on behalf of Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). New Address: Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer, LLP, 850 Third Avenue, 14th Floor, New York, New York, 10022, (212) 687-1980. (Kobylevsky, Irina)
June 10, 2010 Filing 222 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Irina Kobylevsky on behalf of Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS") (Kobylevsky, Irina)
June 2, 2010 Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on May 27, 2010 at 4:00 pm before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (eef)
May 27, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Oral Argument held on 5/27/2010. (Court Reporter Martha Drevis) Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(mov)
May 27, 2010 Filing 220 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Robert T Blakely. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Service was attempted on 6/24/09, 6/25/09,7/16/09, 7/17/09, 7/18/09, 7/20/09, 7/21/09, 7/22/09, 7/23/09. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"), Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Boston Retirement Board. (Hall, Donald)
May 27, 2010 Filing 219 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joann Kahn on behalf of Robert T Blakely (Kahn, Joann)
May 26, 2010 Calendar Entry *COURTROOM NOTIFICATION*: The Oral Argument set for Thursday, May 27, 2010 at 04:00 PM will go forward in Courtroom 18B (*NOT 9A or 20C*) (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(mov)
April 28, 2010 Filing 218 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Allen Robertson on behalf of Robert T Blakely (Robertson, Mark)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeff G. Hammel dated 4/23/2010 re: Counsel for defendant writes on behalf of both themselves and plaintiffs to request an adjournment of the oral argument date. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The oral argument is adjourned to 5/27/2010 at 4:00 p.m. in courtroom 9A. So Ordered., ( Oral Argument set for 5/27/2010 at 04:00 PM Room 9A before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/26/2010) (js)
April 19, 2010 Calendar Entry: Oral Argument on all pending motions (6) set for Thursday, April 29, 2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6A (*NOT 20-C*), 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Requests for adjournment will be considered only if made in writing by Monday, April 26, 2010 and otherwise in accordance with Judge Crotty's Individual Practices (By: Marlon Ovalles Courtroom Deputy). Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC et al.(mov)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FORLEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF: granting # 214 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion of Lead Plaintiff the Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board for an Order granting leave for Autumn W. Smith to withdraw as counsel of record for Plaintiff in this proceeding is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Autumn Wind Smith terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/19/2010) (tve)
April 16, 2010 Filing 215 DECLARATION of Autumn W. Smith in Support re: # 214 MOTION for Autumn W. Smith to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff .. Document filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). (Block, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2010 Filing 214 MOTION for Autumn W. Smith to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff . Document filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM").(Block, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Jeffrey Block to RE-FILE Document # 213 MOTION for Autumn W. Smith to Withdraw as Attorney As Counsel for Plaintiff . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately. Use the event type Declaration in Support found under the event list Replies, Oppositions, Supporting Documents. NOTE: The motion must first be correctly re-filed. (jar)
April 15, 2010 Filing 213 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Autumn W. Smith to Withdraw as Attorney As Counsel for Plaintiff . Document filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Autumn W. Smith in Support of Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff, # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff)(Block, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/16/2010 (jar).
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties, as follows: 1. No response to the complaint in the Smith Action shall be required from any defendant while the 1934 Act Motions to Dismiss are pending. 2. Plaintiff may, but shall not be required to, file an amended complaint in the Smith Action on or before the date that is thirty (30) days after entry of an order determining the 1934 Act Motions to Dismiss. 3. Plaintiff may inform defendants of its intent not to file an amended complaint in the Smith Action at any time after entry of an order determining the 1934 Act Motions to Dismiss. 4. Defendants' deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint in the Smith Action is extended through and including the date that is forty-five (45) days after plaintiff in the Smith Action files an amended complaint or plaintiff notifies defendants that plaintiff will not be filing an amended complaint, whichever of these two events occurs first. 5. If defendants file any motions to dismiss the Smith Action complaint or amended complaint, plaintiff's deadline to respond to any motion(s) to dismiss is forty-five (45) days after the last of such motions is filed and defendants shall file any replies in support of any motions to dismiss no later than twenty-one (21) days after plaintiff files its opposition papers. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/9/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:10-cv-02781-PAC(rjm)
April 2, 2010 Filing 211 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Evan Berger on behalf of Daniel H. Mudd (Berger, James)
February 4, 2010 Filing 210 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Daniel E. Barenbaum on behalf of Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). New Address: One California Street, Suite 900, San Francisco, CA, 94111,. (Barenbaum, Daniel)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties, as follows: 1. No response to the complaint in the CIS Action shall be required from any defendant while the 1934 Act Motions to Dismiss are pending. 2. Plaintiff may, but shall not be required to, file an amended complaint in the CIS Action on or before the date that is thirty (30) days after entry of an order determining the 1934 Act Motions to Dismiss. 3. Plaintiff may inform defendants of its intent not to file an amended complaint in the CIS Action at any time after entry of an order determining the 1934 Act Motions to Dismiss. 4. Defendants' deadline to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in the CIS Action is extended through and including the date that is forty-five (45) days after plaintiff in the CIS Action files an amended complaint or plaintiff notifies defendants that plaintiff will not be filing an amended complaint, whichever of these two events occurs first. 5. If defendants file any motions to dismiss the CIS Action complaint or amended complaint, plaintiffs deadline to respond to any motion(s) to dismiss is forty-five (45) days after the last of such motions is filed and defendants shall file any replies in support of any motions to dismiss no later than 21 days after plaintiff files its opposition papers. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/20/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC(rjm)
January 4, 2010 Filing 208 DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS AGAINST ANNE F. PANKAU. Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1), and the terms of a tolling agreement executed by the parties on November 17, 2009 (incorporated herein by reference), Plaintiffs hereby dismiss this action as against Defendant Anne F. Pankau only, without prejudice. This will not affect any other claims Plaintiffs have against any other party in this litigation. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/4/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(rjm)
December 30, 2009 Filing 207 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (43 in 1:09-cv-01352-PAC, 194 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by Daniel Kramer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(Cohen, Charles)
December 24, 2009 Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 194 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Whipple, Mary)
December 23, 2009 Filing 205 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (43 in 1:09-cv-01352-PAC, 194 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff Daniel Kramer's Motion to Certify an Immediate Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) . Document filed by The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Standard & Poor's Rating Services, Wachovia Capital Markets LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fitch Ratings, Moody's Investors Service, Inc., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, UBS Securities LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(Brandt, James)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey W. Kilduff dated 12/17/09 re: We represent defendant Fannie Mae in this litigation. We write to respectfully request permission to file a reply memorandum of up to 20 pages in further support of Fannie Mae's Motion to Dismiss Claims Under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934. Plaintiffs consent to an enlargement of up to five pages but not the ten pages that Fannie Mae now seeks. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/21/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(rjm)
December 18, 2009 Filing 203 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 167 MOTION to Dismiss Claims under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 in Plaintiffs' Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Fleischer, David)
December 18, 2009 Filing 202 DECLARATION of Michael J. Walsh, Jr. in Support re: # 161 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 14, 33-34, # 2 Exhibit 35-39)(Walsh, Michael)
December 18, 2009 Filing 201 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 161 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Walsh, Michael)
December 18, 2009 Filing 200 DECLARATION of Charles E. Davidow in Support re: # 156 MOTION to Dismiss the Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Deloitte & Touche LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Davidow, Charles)
December 18, 2009 Filing 199 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 156 MOTION to Dismiss the Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Deloitte & Touche LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Davidow, Charles)
December 18, 2009 Filing 198 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 163 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 . / Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Stephen M. Swad's Motion to Dismiss Claims Under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 . Document filed by Stephen M. Swad. (Tuttle, Jonathan)
December 18, 2009 Filing 197 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 155 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kramer, Kelly)
December 10, 2009 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (43 in 1:09-cv-01352-PAC) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by Daniel Kramer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(Cohen, Charles)
December 10, 2009 Filing 194 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. Document filed by Daniel Kramer.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(Cohen, Charles)
December 9, 2009 Filing 193 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. Document filed by Daniel Kramer. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(Cohen, Charles) Modified on 12/10/2009 (jar).
December 8, 2009 Filing 196 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/16/09, 11:30am before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Relates to 09md2013. (rjm)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court DENIES Krauszs motion for relief from withdrawal and dismissal of their complaint in the Krausz Action pursuant to the Consolidation Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close out this motion (Docket #109). (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on November 24, 2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:08-cv-08519-PAC(mov)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER: The Motion to Remand is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close out this motion (Docket #132). (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on November 24, 2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(mov)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER: Accordingly, the motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close out this motion (Docket #113). (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on November 24, 2009) (mov)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER: On October 6, 2009, the Court dismissed the CIS complaint. On October 21, 2009, CIS moved for reconsideration and other relief. Upon consideration of the motion papers, and after hearing argument on November 16, 2009, the Court GRANTS the motion for reconsideration of the October 6, 2009 order. Accordingly, the CIS complaint is reinstated on the Court's docket. In all other respects, CIS's motion of October 21, 2009 is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close out this motion (Docket #183). (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on November 24, 2009) (mov) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2009: # 1 Appendix) (mov). Modified on 11/24/2009 (mov).
November 18, 2009 Filing 188 DECLARATION of Donald R. Hall in Opposition re: # 163 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 ., # 167 MOTION to Dismiss Claims under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 in Plaintiffs' Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint ., # 161 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint ., # 155 MOTION to Dismiss., # 156 MOTION to Dismiss the Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"), Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Boston Retirement Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Hall, Donald)
November 18, 2009 Filing 187 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 167 MOTION to Dismiss Claims under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 in Plaintiffs' Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint ., # 161 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint ., # 155 MOTION to Dismiss., # 156 MOTION to Dismiss the Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint ., # 163 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 .. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"), Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"), Boston Retirement Board. (Hall, Donald)
November 16, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Oral Argument held on 11/16/2009. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter JoAnne Mancari) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(mov)
November 12, 2009 Calendar Entry: Oral Argument on: (i) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Claims Brought Under the Securities Act of 1933; (ii) Plaintiff Daniel Kramer's Motion to Remand; and (iii) C.I.S Motion for Reconsideration set for Monday, November 16, 2009 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J.
November 9, 2009 Calendar Entry: On Monday, November 16, 2009, C.I.S will have five (5) minutes to argue its motion for reconsideration of the Courts Order dated 10/06/2009 (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
November 5, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 186 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jpo)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting # 185 Motion for Patrick F. Linehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/3/2009) (jpo)
October 28, 2009 Filing 185 MOTION for Patrick F. Linehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Robert J. Levin.(mro)
October 21, 2009 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 183 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order of October 6, 2009 or, in the alternative, request for findings of fact and conclusions of law .. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 2), # 4 Exhibit C)(Frisch, Andrew)
October 21, 2009 Filing 183 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order of October 6, 2009 or, in the alternative, request for findings of fact and conclusions of law . Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc..(Frisch, Andrew)
October 20, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Andrew Frisch to RE-FILE Document # 182 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order of October 6, 2009 or, in the alternative, request for findings of fact and conclusions of law . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents must be filed individually. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support found under event list Replies, Oppositions, Supporting Documents. NOTE: The Motion must be correctly re-filed. (jar)
October 20, 2009 Filing 182 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order of October 6, 2009 or, in the alternative, request for findings of fact and conclusions of law . Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 2), # 4 Exhibit C)(Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 10/21/2009 (jar).
October 19, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (132 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Remand., (167 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Dismiss Claims under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 in Plaintiffs' Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .(Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2009 at 11:30 AM before Judge Paul A. Crotty.), Set Deadlines/Hearings: (Oral Argument set for 11/16/2009 at 11:30 AM before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(rjm)
October 19, 2009 Filing 181 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from James E. Brandt dated 10/16/09 re: We represent defendant Fannie Mae. We understand from your deputy, Marlon Ovalles, that Your Honor is unavailable on November 13, 2009 for oral argument on (i) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Claims Brought Under the Securities Act of 1933 and (ii) Plaintiff Daniel Kramer's Motion to Remand. The parties have conferred and suggest November 16, 2009, as the date for argument on both of these motions. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. The oral argument is set for 11/16/09 at 11:30am. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/19/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(rjm)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER WITH RESPECT TO INTERVENTION BY THE FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Pursuant to Rule 24(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, FHFA. Conservator for Fannie Mae, may intervene as a defendant. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/13/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(rjm)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER WITH RESPECT TO INTERVENTION BY THE FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY: It is hereby ordered that pursuant to Rule 24(a) of the F.R.C.P., FHFA, Conservator for Fannie Mae, May intervene as a defendant. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/13/2009) (jpo)
October 1, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 177 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 178 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (pl)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, that Laura Ariane Miller is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Mr. Dallavecchia in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/1/09) (pl)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, that Donald Grayson Yeargin is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Mr. Dallavecchia in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/1/09) (pl)
September 30, 2009 Filing 176 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lenor Marquis Segal on behalf of Robert J. Levin (Segal, Lenor)
September 29, 2009 Filing 175 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Robert Cohen on behalf of Daniel Kramer Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC et al.(Cohen, Charles)
September 29, 2009 Filing 174 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert M. Stern on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association, David Hisey (Stern, Robert)
September 29, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 172 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 173 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 09/25/2009, Receipt Number 701531. (jd)
September 25, 2009 Filing 173 MOTION for Donald Grayson Yeargin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia.(mro)
September 25, 2009 Filing 172 MOTION for Laura Ariane Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia.(mro)
September 24, 2009 Filing 171 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert T Blakely served on 7/24/2009, answer due 8/13/2009. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"); Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"); Boston Retirement Board. (Hall, Donald)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Charles R. Cohen dated 9/23/09 re: Request for permission to file a reply memorandum 18 pages in length. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/23/09) (db)
September 23, 2009 Filing 169 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (25 in 1:09-cv-01352-PAC) MOTION to Remand.. Document filed by Daniel Kramer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(Cohen, Charles)
September 18, 2009 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 167 MOTION to Dismiss Claims under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 in Plaintiffs' Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd. (Fleischer, David)
September 18, 2009 Filing 167 MOTION to Dismiss Claims under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 in Plaintiffs' Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint . Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd.(Fleischer, David)
September 18, 2009 Filing 166 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice re: # 165 Declaration in Support of Motion, # 161 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint ., # 162 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Walsh, Michael)
September 18, 2009 Filing 165 DECLARATION of Michael J. Walsh, Jr. in Support re: # 161 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Exhibit 8-15, # 3 Exhibit 16-32)(Walsh, Michael)
September 18, 2009 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 163 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 .. Document filed by Stephen M. Swad. (Tuttle, Jonathan)
September 18, 2009 Filing 163 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 . Document filed by Stephen M. Swad.(Tuttle, Jonathan)
September 18, 2009 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 161 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Walsh, Michael)
September 18, 2009 Filing 161 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint . Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Walsh, Michael)
September 18, 2009 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 155 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Affidavit)(Kramer, Kelly)
September 18, 2009 Filing 159 DECLARATION of Charles E. Davidow in Support re: # 156 MOTION to Dismiss the Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Deloitte & Touche LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Affidavit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Errata I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Affidavit of Service)(Davidow, Charles)
September 18, 2009 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 155 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia. (Kramer, Kelly)
September 18, 2009 Filing 157 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #160) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 156 MOTION to Dismiss the Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Deloitte & Touche LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Davidow, Charles) Modified on 9/24/2009 (lb).
September 18, 2009 Filing 156 MOTION to Dismiss the Joint Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint . Document filed by Deloitte & Touche LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Davidow, Charles)
September 18, 2009 Filing 155 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Enrico Dallavecchia.(Kramer, Kelly)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER: Please take notice that the above captioned matter is scheduled for a Pretrial/Pre-Motion Conference to take place on Friday. October 2, 2009 at 10:00 a.m in Courtroom 20-C, United States District Court, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Two business days prior to the conference, the parties are directed to e-mail: CrottyNYSDCbambers@nysd.uscourts.gov; a joint letter setting forth the names of all counsel appearing at the conference; their contact information; whom counsel represents; as well as a listing of any topics any party wishes to raise. Any requests for adjournments will not be considered unless the party requesting the adjournment complies with Rule 1E of my Individual Practices (attached). (Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/2/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/17/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC(rjm) Modified on 8/30/2012 (pl).
September 16, 2009 Filing 153 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly Bain Kramer on behalf of Enrico Dallavecchia (Kramer, Kelly)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Charles R. Cohen dated 9/16/2009 re: Counsel writes to request that the deadline for plaintiff''s reply in further support of his motion for remand be extended for 7 days until September. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/16/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(jfe)
September 14, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (31 in 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 151 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 12 in 1:09-cv-06102-PAC) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC(rjm)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER. ORDERED that attorneys Andrew J. Mytelka, M. David Leblanc, Steven Carl Windsor, Eric J. Kirkpatrick and Joe A.C. Fulcher be and hereby are permitted to appear and participate pro hac vice in the above-captioned matter for Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc. granting (148) Motion for Andrew J. Mytelka, M. David Leblanc, Steven Carl Windsor, Eric J. Kirkpatrick and Joe A.C. Fulcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-07831-PAC; granting (30) Motion for Andrew J. Mytelka, M. David Leblanc, Steven Carl Windsor, Eric J. Kirkpatrick and Joe A.C. Fulcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-md-02013-PAC; granting (11) Motion for Andrew J. Mytelka, M. David Leblanc, Steven Carl Windsor, Eric J. Kirkpatrick and Joe A.C. Fulcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06102-PAC. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/14/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC(rjm)
September 9, 2009 Filing 150 DECLARATION of Jeff G. Hammel in Opposition re: (25 in 1:09-cv-01352-PAC, 132 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Remand.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(Brandt, James)
September 9, 2009 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (25 in 1:09-cv-01352-PAC, 132 in 1:08-cv-07831-PAC) MOTION to Remand.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-01352-PAC(Brandt, James)
September 3, 2009 Filing 148 NOTICE OF MOTION OF ATTORNEYS TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE... for Andrew J. Mytelka, M. David Leblanc, Steven Carl Windsor, Eric J. Kirkpatrick, Joe A.C. Fulcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-PAC, 1:08-cv-07831-PAC, 1:09-cv-06102-PAC(rjm)
August 31, 2009 Filing 147 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Gerard E. Lynch, Judge Paul A. Crotty is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-GEL et al.(djc)
August 31, 2009 Filing 146 MDL ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION: This litigation is reassigned to the Honorable Paul A. Crotty for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/28/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-GEL et al.(djc)
August 31, 2009 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:09-md-02013-GEL. (ldi)
August 31, 2009 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:09-md-02013-GEL. (ldi)
August 31, 2009 Filing 145 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Gerard E. Lynch is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi) (ldi).
August 27, 2009 Filing 144 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd, Stephen M. Swad, Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Federal National Mortgage Association, David Hisey. (Brandt, James)
August 26, 2009 Filing 143 RESPONSE to the Court's Order to Show Cause of August 17, 2009 (with supporting memorandum and proposed order) . Document filed by Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.. (Frisch, Andrew)
August 26, 2009 Filing 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew James Frisch on behalf of Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc. (Frisch, Andrew)
August 17, 2009 Filing 141 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel E. Barenbaum on behalf of Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM") (Barenbaum, Daniel)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby ordered that the complaints in the following actions shall be dismissed, and the cases closed: Rollins v. Lehman Bros., Inc. (08 Civ. 7938 ); Crisafi v. Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. (08 Civ. 8008); Fogel Capital Mgmt. v. Federal Nat'l Home Mortage Ass'n (08 Civ. 8096); Sandman v. J.P. Morgan (08 Civ. 8353); Orkin v. Merrill Lynch (08 Civ. 8488); Jarmain v. Merrill Lynch (08 Civ. 8491); McCauley v. Merrill Lynch (08 Civ. 8520); Frankfurt v. Lehman Bros. (08 Civ. 8547); Strong v. Wachovia Capital Markets LLC (08 Civ. 8551); Schweitzer v. Merrill Lynch (08 Civ. 8609); Williams v. Ashley (08 Civ. 8676); Kraus v. Citigroup Global Markets (08 Civ. 9649); Melton v. E*Trade Securities LLC (08 Civ. 9650); Gordon v. Ashley (09 Civ. 1351); Jesteadt v. Ashley (09 Civ. 1367). Plaintiff in Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc. v. Mudd (09 Civ. 6102) shall show cause in writing on or before August 26,2009, why the complaint in that individual action should not be dismissed pursuant to the Court's Order of April 16, 2009. Krausz v. Federal National Mortgage Ass'n (08 Civ. 8519) shall remain open on the docket as a separate action, albeit consolidated with the principal action. As this order disposes of Krausz's Motion for Relief from Withdrawal and Dismissal Pursuant to the Order of April 16,2009, the Clerk is respectfully directed to mark that motion as closed. Kramer v. Federal National Mortgage Ass'n (09 Civ. 1352) shall remain open on the docket as a separate action, albeit consolidated with the principal action, pending the Court's decision on Kramer's Motion to Remand. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/17/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-GEL et al.(jpo)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from Jeff G. Hammel dated 8/11/09 re: Defendants' request an extension of time until 9/9/09 to respond to the Motion to Remand. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to # 132 MOTION to Remand: (Responses due by 9/9/2009) (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/12/09) (db)
August 12, 2009 Filing 138 DECLARATION of Donald R. Hall in Opposition re: # 113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Hall, Donald)
August 12, 2009 Filing 137 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"). (Hall, Donald)
August 11, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/18/2009. Replies due by 12/18/2009. Responses due by 11/18/2009 (tve)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from Jeff Hammel dated 8/7/2009 re: Counsel for defendant "Fannie Mae" writes on behalf of all defendants to request a 4 week extension of time to file a motions to dismiss the 1934 Act claims and, on behalf of Fannie Mae, permission to file a brief up to 40 pages in support of its motion and that the Court approve the following proposed schedule: Motion to dismiss 9/18/2009; Opposition to Motion to Dismiss 11/18/2009; Defendants' Reply Brief 12/18/2009. ENDORSEMENT: Granted, as is plaintiffs' request to file a brief as long as defendants' total briefing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/10/2009) (tve)
August 6, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 135 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (rw)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting # 130 Motion for Jeffrey W. Kilduff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/6/09) (rw)
August 6, 2009 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Daniel Kramer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-GEL, 1:09-cv-01352-GEL(Cohen, Charles)
August 6, 2009 Filing 133 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (25 in 1:09-cv-01352-GEL, 132 in 1:08-cv-07831-GEL) MOTION to Remand.. Document filed by Daniel Kramer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-GEL, 1:09-cv-01352-GEL(Cohen, Charles)
August 6, 2009 Filing 132 MOTION to Remand. Document filed by Daniel Kramer.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-GEL, 1:09-cv-01352-GEL(Cohen, Charles)
August 5, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Charles Robert Cohen to RE-FILE Document # 131 MOTION to Remand. ERROR(S): Supporting Document must be filed separately (i.e. Memorandum in Support of Motion to be filed individually). ***REMINDER*** - First Re-File Motion, then file and link any supporting documents. (db)
August 5, 2009 Filing 131 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Remand. Document filed by Daniel Kramer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification of Service, # 3 Memorandum of Law)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-GEL, 1:09-cv-01352-GEL(Cohen, Charles) Modified on 8/6/2009 (db).
July 31, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 130 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 07/28/2009, Receipt Number 694784. (jd)
July 29, 2009 Filing 129 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Deloitte & Touche LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Serivce)(Karp, Brad)
July 29, 2009 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Edward Davidow on behalf of Deloitte & Touche LLP (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Davidow, Charles)
July 29, 2009 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of Deloitte & Touche LLP (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Karp, Brad)
July 28, 2009 Filing 130 MOTION for Jeffrey W. Kilduff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02013-GEL, 1:08-cv-07831-GEL(rjm)
July 27, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 126 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tro)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER FOR ADMISSION OF DANIEL E. BARENBAUM PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting # 124 Motion for Daniel E. Barenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Daniel E. Barenbaum is admitted the practice pro hac vice as counsel for Lead Plaintiff Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board in this action. Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 7/24/09) (tro)
July 24, 2009 Filing 125 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 109 MOTION For Relief From Withdrawal and Dismissal Pursuant to the Order of April 16, 2009 .. Document filed by Malka Krausz. (D'Agnenica, Jason)
July 24, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 124 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 07/20/2009, Receipt Number 694604. (jd)
July 20, 2009 Filing 124 MOTION for Daniel E. Barenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM").(mro)
July 20, 2009 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (109 in 1:08-cv-07831-GEL) MOTION For Relief From Withdrawal and Dismissal Pursuant to the Order of April 16, 2009 ., (57 in 1:08-cv-08519-GEL) MOTION for Relief from Withdrawal and Dismissal Pursuant to the Order of April 16, 2009. . Document filed by Boston Retirement Board, Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"), Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-GEL, 1:08-cv-08519-GEL(Hall, Donald)
July 20, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 122 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jpo)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting # 116 Motion for Autumn W. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 7/20/2009) (jpo)
July 20, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 121 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jpo)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting # 117 Motion for Glen Devalerio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 7/20/2009) (jpo)
July 17, 2009 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (109 in 1:08-cv-07831-GEL) MOTION For Relief From Withdrawal and Dismissal Pursuant to the Order of April 16, 2009 ., (57 in 1:08-cv-08519-GEL) MOTION for Relief from Withdrawal and Dismissal Pursuant to the Order of April 16, 2009.. Document filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Federal Nat'l Mortgage Assoc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-GEL, 1:08-cv-08519-GEL(Brandt, James)
July 15, 2009 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Samuel Olney on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Olney, Eric)
July 15, 2009 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeff G. Hammel on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Hammel, Jeff)
July 15, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 117 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 116 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 07/13/2009, Receipt Number 694050. (jd)
July 13, 2009 Filing 117 MOTION for Glen DeValerio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"), Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM").(dle)
July 13, 2009 Filing 116 MOTION for Autumn Wind Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"), Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM").(dle)
July 13, 2009 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Jeff G. Hammel in Support re: # 113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd, Stephen M. Swad, Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Federal National Mortgage Association, David Hisey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Brandt, James)
July 13, 2009 Filing 114 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd, Stephen M. Swad, Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Federal National Mortgage Association, David Hisey. (Brandt, James)
July 13, 2009 Filing 113 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd, Stephen M. Swad, Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Federal National Mortgage Association, David Hisey.(Brandt, James)
July 2, 2009 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Malka Krausz. (D'Agnenica, Jason)
July 2, 2009 Filing 111 DECLARATION of Jason D'Agnenica in Support re: # 109 MOTION For Relief From Withdrawal and Dismissal Pursuant to the Order of April 16, 2009 .. Document filed by Malka Krausz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 3)(D'Agnenica, Jason)
July 2, 2009 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 109 MOTION For Relief From Withdrawal and Dismissal Pursuant to the Order of April 16, 2009 .. Document filed by Malka Krausz. (D'Agnenica, Jason)
July 2, 2009 Filing 109 MOTION For Relief From Withdrawal and Dismissal Pursuant to the Order of April 16, 2009 . Document filed by Malka Krausz. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'Agnenica, Jason)
July 2, 2009 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter S. Pearlman on behalf of Daniel Kramer Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-GEL, 1:09-cv-01352-GEL(Pearlman, Peter)
July 2, 2009 Filing 107 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dan Litvin on behalf of Daniel Kramer (Litvin, Dan)
July 2, 2009 Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Warren Fisher on behalf of Daniel Kramer (Fisher, Scott)
July 2, 2009 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Robert Cohen on behalf of Daniel Kramer (Cohen, Charles)
June 29, 2009 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael John Walsh on behalf of David Hisey, Federal National Mortgage Association (Walsh, Michael)
June 25, 2009 Filing 103 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 09-1294-op. Petitioner, through counsel, has filed a petition for a writ of mandamus. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the mandamus petition is DENIED because Petitioner has not demonstrated that exceptional circumstances warrant the requested relief. See In re von Bulow, 828 F.2d 94, 96 (2d Cir. 1987). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 6/23/2009. (nd)
June 22, 2009 Filing 102 JOINT CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT amending # 1 Complaint against Federal National Mortgage Association, Robert T Blakely, Enrico Dallavecchia, Deloitte & Touche LLP, Daniel H. Mudd, Stephen M. Swad. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS"), Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM"). Related document: # 1 Complaint filed by John A. Genovese.(dle)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from Donald R. Hall dated 5/26/09 re: Counsel for Lead Plaintiff the Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System and, on behalf of TCRS and lead plaintiffs the Massachusetts Public Pension Funds and their lead counsel, write to request a three-week extension of the deadline for Lead Plaintiffs to file the Joint Consolidated Complaint. In addition, Defendants' counsel has indicated that Defendants request a two-week extension to answer or move to dismiss all non Securities Act of 1933 claims. Requested Modified Schedule is as follows: Consolidated Amended Complaint to be filed by 6/22/09; 33 Act MTDs filed by 7/13/09; Complaint in all Fannie Mae actions dismissed unless cause show by 7/6/09; Ds response/MTDs for all non- '33Act claims by 8/21/09; Ps response to '33 Act MTDs by 8/12/09; Ds reply in '33 Act MTDs by 8/27/09; Ps response to Ds Motion/answer to non- '33 Act claims by 10/5/09; Ds reply to non-'33 Act MTDs by 11/4/09. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 5/28/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-07831-GEL et al.(tro)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that plaintiff Daniel Kramer shall file the motion for remand with the Clerk of the Court. The motion for remand shall be considered an open motion to be addressed by the Court in due course. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 5/28/2009) (jpo)
April 29, 2009 Filing 99 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc..(Abrams, Floyd)
April 29, 2009 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tammy Lynn Roy on behalf of The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc. (Roy, Tammy)
April 29, 2009 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Penny Windle on behalf of The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc. (Windle, Sarah)
April 29, 2009 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Floyd Abrams on behalf of The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc. (Abrams, Floyd)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E Lynch from Grayson Kelley dated 4/14/09 re: Request that I be released from any further involvement in this case, including the receipt of any future electronic notifications regarding this action. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 4/27/09) (cd)
April 16, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2009. (pl)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER; 1. that the actions listed on the annexed schedule under the heading "Schedule of Fannie Mae Securities Actions," as well as any other action pertaining to Fannie Mae, now pending before, hereafter filed in, or hereafter transferred to this Court, including the actions transferred to this Court pursuant to the order of the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation dated February 11, 2009, brought under the federal securities laws or state laws relating to the issuance, purchase or sale of securities ("Fannie Mae Securities Actions") are consolidated for pretrial purposes in the manner described below (the "Consolidated Securities Action"). 2. The Clerk of this Court shall file a copy of this Order in the separate file for each of the Fannie Mae Securities Actions. Unless otherwise ordered by this Court, future filings in any Fannie Mae Securities Action herein consolidated shall be filed and docketed only under 1:08-cv-07831-GEL. All counsel who have entered appearances in any of the actions listed on the attached schedule shall be deemed to have entered an appearance in that: Consolidated Securities Action under the docket 1:08-cv-07831-GEL. All motions for admission pro hac vice and all orders granting such motions in any case listed on the annexed schedule shall also be deemed filed in the Consolidated Securities Action under the docket 1:08-cv-07831-GEL. 3. The Court requests the assistance of counsel in calling to the attention of the Clerk of this Court the filing or transfer of any case that might properly be consolidated as part of this litigation. Any action involving substantially related questions of law and fact hereafter filed in or transferred to this Court shall be consolidated under the master file number assigned to this case. 4. Every pleading filed in the Consolidated Securities Action shall bear the caption: In re FANNIE MAE 2008 SECURITIES LITIGATION. 5. Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B) and 15 U.S.C. 77z-1(a)(3)(B), Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS") is appointed Lead Plaintiff on behalf of the Preferred Shareholder Class ("Preferred Shareholder Lead Plaintiff'). 6. Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B) and 15 U.S.C. 77z-1(a)(3)(B), Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM") and the Boston Retirement Board ("Boston") (collectively, the "Massachusetts Public Pension Funds") are appointed Lead Plaintiff on behalf of the Stockholder Class ("Stockholder Lead Plaintiff) (collectively, Preferred Shareholder Lead Plaintiff and Stockholder Lead Plaintiff, "Lead Plaintiffs").7. The Court approves the Preferred Shareholder Lead Plaintiffs selection of KaplanFox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel for the Preferred Shareholder Class ("Lead Counsel for Preferred"). 8. The Court approves the Stockholder Lead Plaintiffs selection of Labaton Sucharow LLP and Berman DeValerio as Lead Counsel for the Stockholder Class ("Lead Counsel for the Common"). 9. Lead Plaintiffs shall file a Joint Consolidated Complaint ("Joint Complaint") within 45 days of the entry of this Order. Therefore, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close out all motions in those cases for purposes of all internal statistical reports. Lead Counsel for the Common and Preferred shall also serve a copy of this signed Order on counsel for all parties in the Fannie Mae Securities Actions. SCHEDULE OF IMPORTANT DEADLINES IN FANNIE MAE, 08civ7831 June 1,2009 - Consolidated Amended Complaint Filed, June 22,2009 - '33 Act MTDs filed, June 15, 2009 - Complaints in all Fannie Mae actions dismissed unless cause shown, July 16,2009 - Ds response/MTDs for all non-'33 Act claims, July 22,2009 - Ps response to '33 Act MTDs, August 6, 2009 - Ds reply in '33 Act MTDs, August 31, 2009 - Ps response to Ds motion/answer to non-'33 Act, claim, September 15, 2009 - Ds reply in non-'33 Act MTDs. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 4/16/09) (pl) Modified on 4/17/2009 (pl).
April 10, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 93 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tve)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting # 78 Motion for Bryan Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 4/9/2009) (tve)
March 26, 2009 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:09-md-02013-GEL. (rjm)
March 12, 2009 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/13/09 before Judge Gerard E. Lynch. (ama)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: To the extent TCRS requests that the Court reconsider its decision to appoint separate lead plaintiffs for the Common Shareholder Class and the Preferred Shareholder Class, its request is denied. The Massachusetts Public Pension Funds' request that Labaton Sucharow and Berman DeValerio be appointed co-lead counsel for the Common Shareholder Class is granted. The Massachusetts Public Pension Funds and TCRS shall provide the Court with a proposed case management order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 3/9/2009) (tve)
March 6, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 78 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 02/17/2009, Receipt Number 679384. (jd)
March 6, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 81 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 83 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 02/13/2009, Receipt Number 679240. (jd)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT movants Deka International S.A. Luxembourg ("DIL"), International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg ("IFM"), and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System ("NCRS," which includes the Teachers' and State Employees' Retirement System, the Consolidated Judicial Retirement System, the Firemen's and Rescue Workers' Pension Fund, the Local Governmental Employees' Retirement System, the Legislative Retirement System, and the North Carolina National Guard Pension Fund) (collectively with DIL and IFM the "Institutional Investor Group"), hereby withdraw their motion for consolidation of similar cases, appointment of lead plaintiff, and approval of lead counsel in the above-captioned actions. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/09) (js)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT movants Dr. Martin Mahler, Mr. Danny Austin and Mrs. Eleanor Maro (collectively, the "Series T Preferred Investor Group"), by and through their counsel, hereby withdraw their motion for consolidation of similar cases, appointment of lead plaintiff, and approval of lead counsel in the above-captioned actions based upon the competing motions filed by: the parties set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/09) (js)
March 2, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 88 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (dle)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The motion for admission pro hac vice in the matters set forth herein is granted. The admitted attorney, Michael J. Baratz is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. An attorney admitted to practice pro hac vice is required to pay a $25.00 per attorney admission fee and present this Order to the intake deputy clerk in the Clerk's Office. When paying by mail, return a copy of this Order to the Clerk's Office with the required fee. This order confirms your appearance as counsel in this case, and it will be entered on the Court's docket. A notation of your admission pro hac vice for the listed cases will be made on the roll of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/09) (dle)
March 2, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 87 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (dle)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The motion for admission pro hac vice in the matters set forth herein is granted. The admitted attorney, Mark J. Hulkower is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. An attorney admitted to practice pro hac vice is required to pay a $25.00 per attorney admission fee and present this Order to the intake deputy clerk in the Clerk's Office. When paying by mail, return a copy of this Order to the Clerk's Office with the required fee. This order confirms your appearance as counsel in this case, and it will be entered on the Court's docket. A notation of your admission pro hac vice for the listed cases will be made on the roll of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/09) (dle)
March 2, 2009 Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melinda D. Rodon on behalf of Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System (Rodon, Melinda)
February 27, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 80 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 02/10/2009, Receipt Number 679021. (jd)
February 25, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 85 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (pl)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, granting # 80 Motion for James Wareham and James Anklam to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/25/09) (pl)
February 24, 2009 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/13/2009 before Judge Gerard E. Lynch. (jmi)
February 20, 2009 Filing 82 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL: Movants Dr. Martin Mahler, Mr. Danny Austin and Mrs. Elanor Maro hereby withdraw their motion for consolidation for similar cases, appointment of lead plaintiff, and approval of lead counsel in this action based upon the completing motions filed by (1) Horizon Asset Management, Inc.; (2) the Institutional Investor Group; (3) the Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System; (4) the Massachusetts Public Pension Funds; (5) UniSuper Limited; (6) the Almeda County Employees Retirement Association; (7) the Frankfurt Group and Insurance Group; (8) Fogel Capital Management and the Snow Family; (9) the Strong Group; (10) Susan Kraus; and (11) Lynn and SteveAnn Williams. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/12/09) (tro)
February 13, 2009 Filing 83 MOTION for Mark J. Hulkower to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Robert J. Levin.(dle)
February 13, 2009 Filing 81 MOTION for Michael J. Baratz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Robert J. Levin.(dle)
February 13, 2009 Filing 79 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the action(s) listed... and pending... be, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York and, with consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Gerard E. Lynch, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district... (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/11/2009) (laq)
February 13, 2009 Filing 78 MOTION for Bryan Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Massachusetts Public Pension Funds.(dle)
February 12, 2009 Filing 77 MOTION WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF SIMILAR CASES, APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL re: # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai. Document filed by Deka International S.A., Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A., Luxembourg, Richard H. Moore.(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
February 11, 2009 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott N. Auby on behalf of Stephen M. Swad (Auby, Scott)
February 10, 2009 Filing 80 MOTION for James Wareham and James Anklam to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Daniel H. Mudd.(dle)
February 10, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Robert N Cappucci to E-MAIL Document No. # 75 Withdrawal of Motion to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov (***send this document with signature not s/***). This document is not filed via ECF. (db)
February 10, 2009 Filing 75 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of Withdrawal re: # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 9 Declaration in Support of Motion,, # 8 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by Martin Mahler, Danny Austin, Eleanor Maro. (Cappucci, Robert) Modified on 2/11/2009 (db).
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER; that the Court having recognized the need for an initial conference, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties and movants in the above-referenced matters shall appear before this Court on February 13, 2009, at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 1/23/09) (pl)
January 6, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 12/08/2008, Receipt Number 671731. (jd)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Solomon Cera for Horizon Asset Management, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 12/15/2008) (tve)
December 11, 2008 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Solomon B. Cera in Support re: # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Taylor, Philip)
December 11, 2008 Filing 71 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Philip)
December 11, 2008 Filing 70 NOTICE of Withdrawal re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Unisuper Limited. (Rosenfeld, David)
December 11, 2008 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Professor Bruce A. Green in Support re: # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Massachusetts Public Pension Funds. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Keller, Christopher)
December 11, 2008 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Alan I. Ellman in Support re: # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Massachusetts Public Pension Funds. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Keller, Christopher)
December 11, 2008 Filing 67 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Massachusetts Public Pension Funds. (Keller, Christopher)
December 11, 2008 Filing 66 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Donald R. Hall in Support re: # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System. (Hall, Donald)
December 11, 2008 Filing 65 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). and in Opposition to all other Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Lead Counsel . Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System. (Hall, Donald)
December 11, 2008 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Geoffrey C. Jarvis in Support re: # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai. Document filed by Deka International S.A., Luxembourg, Richard H. Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
December 11, 2008 Filing 63 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel ., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai, # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Deka International S.A., Luxembourg, Richard H. Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
December 11, 2008 Filing 62 SECOND MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel ., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai, # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Cheryl Strong. (Bronson, Kent)
December 11, 2008 Filing 61 SECOND MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel ., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai, # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Phillip Melton. (Bronson, Kent)
December 11, 2008 Filing 60 SECOND MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel ., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai, # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Susan Kraus. (Bronson, Kent)
December 8, 2008 Filing 59 MOTION for Solomon B. Cera to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc.(dle)
December 5, 2008 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on # 41 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 11/19/2008, Receipt Number 669104. (jd)
December 1, 2008 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel ., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Deka International S.A., Luxembourg, Richard H. Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 COS)(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
November 28, 2008 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Alan I. Ellman in Opposition re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel ., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai, # 40 MOTION for Grayson Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice., # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Massachusetts Public Pension Funds. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Certificate of Service)(Keller, Christopher)
November 28, 2008 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel ., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai, # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Massachusetts Public Pension Funds. (Keller, Christopher)
November 28, 2008 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). and in Opposition to all other Motions . Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System. (Hall, Donald)
November 28, 2008 Filing 53 DECLARATION of DONALD R. HALL in Support re: # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Hall, Donald)
November 28, 2008 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). and in Opposition to all other Motions . Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System. (Hall, Donald)
November 25, 2008 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 50 Response to Motion, # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai. Document filed by Roy Cooper. (Kelley, Grayson)
November 25, 2008 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re: # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai. Document filed by Roy Cooper. (Kelley, Grayson)
November 24, 2008 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel ., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai, # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Phillip Melton. (Seidman, Peter)
November 24, 2008 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Phillip Melton. (Bronson, Kent)
November 24, 2008 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Cheryl Strong. (Bronson, Kent)
November 24, 2008 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re: # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel ., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai, # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Unisuper Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rosenfeld, David)
November 24, 2008 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum in Opposition to Competing Motions for Appoinment of Lead Plaintiff served on Competing Lead Plaintiff Movants and Defendants' Counsel on 11/24/08. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc.. (Taylor, Philip)
November 24, 2008 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Andrew Fishman in Support re: # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Taylor, Philip)
November 24, 2008 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Solomon B. Cera in Support re: # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Taylor, Philip)
November 24, 2008 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel ., # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai, # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc.. (Taylor, Philip)
November 24, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: # 41 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (db)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting # 40 Motion for Grayson Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Movant Roy Cooper. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 11/22/08) (db)
November 19, 2008 Filing 40 MOTION for Grayson Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Roy Cooper.(dle)
November 18, 2008 Filing 39 NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association. (Silk, Gerald)
November 17, 2008 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Fleischer on behalf of Daniel H. Mudd (Fleischer, David)
November 17, 2008 Filing 37 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc..(Taylor, Philip)
November 17, 2008 Filing 36 BRIEF re: # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel .. Document filed by Frankfurt Group and Insurance Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3-6)(Qian, Fei-Lu)
November 17, 2008 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J. Clarke, Jr on behalf of Stephen B. Ashley (Clarke, John)
November 7, 2008 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Unisuper Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rosenfeld, David)
November 7, 2008 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Unisuper Limited. (Rosenfeld, David)
November 7, 2008 Filing 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831; 08-cv-08008; 08-cv-08096; 08-cv-08353; 08-cv-08491; 08-cv-08547; 08-cv-08551; 08-cv-08609; 08cv-08676., MOTION to Appoint Unisuper Limited to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Unisuper Limited.(Rosenfeld, David)
November 7, 2008 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert N. Kaplan on behalf of Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System (Kaplan, Robert)
November 7, 2008 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Gerald H. Silk in Support re: # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Silk, Gerald)
November 7, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederic Scott Fox, Sr on behalf of Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System (Fox, Frederic)
November 7, 2008 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association. (Silk, Gerald)
November 7, 2008 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Alameda County Employees Retirement Association to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Alameda County Employees Retirement Association.(Silk, Gerald)
November 7, 2008 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Philip Campisi on behalf of Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System (Campisi, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2008 Filing 25 NOTICE of Notice of Lynn and SteveAnn Williams Motion for Consolidation, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Lead Counsel on Behalf of Federal National Home Mortgage Preferred Stock Series S Shareholders. Document filed by Lynn Williams, Steveann Williams. (Federman, William)
November 7, 2008 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Alan I. Ellman in Support re: # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Massachusetts Public Pension Funds. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Keller, Christopher)
November 7, 2008 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Massachusetts Public Pension Funds. (Keller, Christopher)
November 7, 2008 Filing 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-cv-07831, 08-cv-07938, 08-cv-08008, 08-cv-08096, 08-cv-08353, 08-cv-08488, 08-cv-08491, 08-cv-08519, 08-cv-08520, 08-cv-08547, 08-cv-08551, 08-cv-08609, 08-cv-08676., MOTION to Appoint Massachusetts Public Pension Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Massachusetts Public Pension Funds. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Christopher)
November 7, 2008 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel served on Other Counsel Related to Federal National Mortgage Association Class Actions on 11/07/08. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc.. (Levit, Lawrence)
November 7, 2008 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel .. Document filed by Frankfurt Group and Insurance Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gross, Marc)
November 7, 2008 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint The Frankfurt Group and The Insurance Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and approval of co-lead counsel . Document filed by Frankfurt Group and Insurance Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gross, Marc)
November 7, 2008 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Thomas C. Bright in Support re: # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Levit, Lawrence)
November 7, 2008 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Geffrey C. Jarvis in Support re: # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai. Document filed by Richard H. Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certifications, # 2 Exhibit B - Class Notice, # 3 Exhibit C - G&E Firm Biography)(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
November 7, 2008 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plai ntiff(s) . Document filed by Deka International S.A., Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A., Luxembourg, Richard H. Moore. (Jarvis, Geoffrey)
November 7, 2008 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc.. (Levit, Lawrence)
November 7, 2008 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Donald R. Hall in Support re: # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System. (Hall, Donald)
November 7, 2008 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Deka International S.A. Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A. Luxembourg and Richard H. Moore, as Treasurer of the State of North Carolina and as the sole trustee of the North Carolina Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Deka International S.A., Luxembourg, International Fund Management S.A., Luxembourg, Richard H. Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
November 7, 2008 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System. (Hall, Donald)
November 7, 2008 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Horizon Asset Management, Inc. to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Horizon Asset Management, Inc..(Levit, Lawrence)
November 7, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Lead Counsel ., MOTION to Appoint Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-7831, 1:08-cv-7938, 1:08-cv-8008, 1:08-cv-8096, 1:08-cv-8353, 1:08-cv-8488, 1:08-cv-8491, 1:08-cv-8519, 1:08-cv-8520, 1:08-cv-8551, 1:08-cv-8547, 1:08-cv-8609, 1:08-cv-8676. Document filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System.(Hall, Donald)
November 7, 2008 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Robert N. Cappucci in Support re: # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Martin Mahler, Danny Austin, Eleanor Maro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cappucci, Robert)
November 7, 2008 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551. MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Martin Mahler, Danny Austin, Eleanor Maro. (Cappucci, Robert)
November 7, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:08-cv-08008, 1:08-cv-08488, 1:08-cv-08491 and 1:08-cv-08551., MOTION to Appoint Dr. Martin Mahler, Danny Austin and Eleanor L. Maro to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation . Document filed by Martin Mahler, Danny Austin, Eleanor Maro.(Cappucci, Robert)
November 7, 2008 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert N Cappucci on behalf of Martin Mahler, Danny Austin, Eleanor Maro (Cappucci, Robert)
November 7, 2008 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Gustavo Bruckner in Support re: # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 part 1 of 2, # 7 Exhibit 6 part 2 of 2, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Nespole, Gregory)
November 7, 2008 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: # 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family. (Nespole, Gregory)
November 7, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Nespole, Gregory)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER: The undersigned attorneys accept service of the summons and complaint in this action on their respective client's behalf as of the date of this stipulation. 2. The time for Mr. Ashley, Mr. Levin and Mr. Mudd to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action is extended until 45 days after a consolidated amended complaint has been filed in this action or in any action into which this action is consolidated. 3. If counsel for plaintiff John Genovese is selected lead counsel in this action (or in any action into which this action is consolidated) pursuant to section 21D of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934, Mr. Ashley, Mr. Levin and Mr. Mudd agree that the lead plaintiff shall file a consolidated amended complaint no later than 45 days after entry of the Court's order appointing lead plaintiff and lead counsel. 4. Mr, Ashley, Mr. Levin and Mr. Mudd each expressly reserves all defenses other than insufficient process or insufficient service of process. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 10/20/08) (js)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION AND ORDER The undersigned attorneys accept service of the complaint in this action on their respective clients behalf as of the date of this stipulation. The time for all defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action is extended until 45 days after a consolidated amended complaint has been filed in this action or in any action into which this action is consolidated. If counsel for plaintiff John Genovese is selected lead counsel in this action ( or in any action into which this action is consolidated) pursuant to section 21D of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934, defendants agree that the lead plaintiff shall file a consolidated amended complaint no later than 45 days after the entry of the courts order appointing lead plaintiff and lead counsel. Each defendant expressly reserves all defenses other than insufficient process of insufficient service of process. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 10/20/08) (mme)
September 12, 2008 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney for noncompliance with Section (14.3) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document # 1 Complaint to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (mbe)
September 8, 2008 Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
September 8, 2008 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (mbe)
September 8, 2008 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen B. Ashley, Daniel H. Mudd, Stephen M. Swad, Robert J. Levin. (mbe)
September 8, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen B. Ashley, Daniel H. Mudd, Stephen M. Swad, Robert J. Levin. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 662431)Document filed by John A. Genovese.(mbe) (mbe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Fannie Mae 2008 Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc.
Represented By: David John Booth
Represented By: Kelly-Ann Fayette Clarke
Represented By: Janet LaRene Wells Rushing
Represented By: Eric J. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Andrew James Frisch
Represented By: Michael David Le Blanc
Represented By: Andrew J. Mytelka
Represented By: Joseph A.C. Fulcher
Represented By: Steven Carl Windsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Frankfurt
Represented By: H. Adam Prussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Genovese
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kramer
Represented By: Charles Robert Cohen
Represented By: Dan Litvin
Represented By: Scott Warren Fisher
Represented By: Peter S. Pearlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Boston Retirement Board
Represented By: Jonathan M. Plasse
Represented By: Thomas A. Dubbs
Represented By: Richard T. Joffe
Represented By: John Henby Sutter
Represented By: Louis Gottlieb
Represented By: Joshua Lon Crowell
Represented By: Joseph Alberto Fonti
Represented By: Thomas Gregory Hoffman, Jr.,
Represented By: Nicole M. Zeiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Management Board ("PRIM")
Represented By: Jonathan M. Plasse
Represented By: Daniel E. Barenbaum
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Donald R. Hall, Jr
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Trombley
Represented By: Bryan Andrew Wood
Represented By: Thomas A. Dubbs
Represented By: Richard T. Joffe
Represented By: John Henby Sutter
Represented By: Victor Santiago Elias
Represented By: Joshua Lon Crowell
Represented By: Joseph Alberto Fonti
Represented By: Autumn Wind Smith
Represented By: Christopher J. Keller
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Block
Represented By: Justin N. Saif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System ("TCRS")
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Represented By: Donald R. Hall, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A. Dubbs
Represented By: John Henby Sutter
Represented By: Jeffrey Philip Campisi
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Damien Harris Weinstein
Represented By: Autumn Wind Smith
Represented By: Frederic Scott Fox, Sr
Represented By: Irina Kobylevsky
Represented By: Justin N. Saif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Susan Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Linda P. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Stephen H. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: The David Frankfurt 2002 Family Trust
Represented By: H. Adam Prussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lynn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Steveann Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: the Frankfurt Family Ltd.
Represented By: H. Adam Prussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen B. Ashley
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Securities LLC
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T Blakely
Represented By: Joann Kahn
Represented By: Mark Allen Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrico Dallavecchia
Represented By: Daphne T Ha
Represented By: Amanda Rios
Represented By: Rebecca Sarah Kahan
Represented By: Diane Nicole Princ
Represented By: David J. Stanoch
Represented By: Catherine Vera Wigglesworth
Represented By: David Paul Staubitz
Represented By: Rebecca Kahan Waldman
Represented By: Andrew J. Levander
Represented By: Hector Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael Hun Park
Represented By: Kelly Bain Kramer
Represented By: Laura Ariane Miller
Represented By: Emily Shea
Represented By: Donald Grayson Yeargin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte & Touche LLP
Represented By: Charles Edward Davidow
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Scott Kurtis McCulloch
Represented By: Eric Samuel Olney
Represented By: Wendy Helene Schwartz
Represented By: Robert M. Stern
Represented By: Michael John Walsh
Represented By: James Ellis Brandt
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Kilduff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Levin
Represented By: Alejandro Gabriel Rosenberg
Represented By: Lenor Marquis Segal
Represented By: Patrick F. Linehan
Represented By: Erik L. Kitchen
Represented By: Mark J. Hulkower
Represented By: Michael Jeremy Baratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Eric Brendan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H. Mudd
Represented By: Jeffrey David Rotenberg
Represented By: Katherine Ruffing
Represented By: Adam James van Alstyne
Represented By: James Evan Berger
Represented By: David Fleischer
Represented By: James D. Wareham
Represented By: James E. Anklam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Swad
Represented By: Scott N. Auby
Represented By: Jonathan Rosser Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd Abrams
Represented By: Tammy Lynn Roy
Represented By: Sarah Penny Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Dennis R. Beresford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Deutsche Banc Securities Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Louis J. Freeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Brenda J. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Goldman Sachs & CO.
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Agnes Dunogue
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Craig Scott Waldman
Represented By: Shannon Price Torres
Represented By: George S Wang
Represented By: Michael Joseph Chepiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: David Hisey
Represented By: Robert M. Stern
Represented By: Michael John Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Karen N. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Agnes Dunogue
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Craig Scott Waldman
Represented By: Shannon Price Torres
Represented By: George S Wang
Represented By: Michael Joseph Chepiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: JP Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Bridget A. Macaskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: Agnes Dunogue
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Craig Scott Waldman
Represented By: Shannon Price Torres
Represented By: George S Wang
Represented By: Michael Joseph Chepiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Leslie Rahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Greg C. Sites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Patrick Swygert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John K. Wulff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: Eric Samuel Olney
Represented By: Gregory Bertram Reilly, III
Represented By: Mary Gibbons Whipple
Represented By: Joseph J. Aronica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Fund Management S.A., Luxembourg
Represented By: Geoffrey Coyle Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard H. Moore
Represented By: Geoffrey Coyle Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martin Mahler
Represented By: Robert N Cappucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phillip Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roy Cooper
Represented By: Grayson Gordon Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System
Represented By: Frederic Scott Fox, Sr
Represented By: Melinda D. Campbell
Represented By: Donald R. Hall, Jr
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Jeffrey Philip Campisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny Austin
Represented By: Robert N Cappucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Unisuper Limited
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fogel Capital Management, Inc. and The Snow Family
Represented By: Gregory Mark Nespole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Horizon Asset Management, Inc.
Represented By: Solomon B. Cera
Represented By: Lawrence Donald Levit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eleanor Maro
Represented By: Robert N Cappucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frankfurt Group and Insurance Group
Represented By: Marc Ian Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James W. Giddens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Malka Krausz
Represented By: Jason Robert D'Agnenica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deka International S.A., Luxembourg
Represented By: Geoffrey Coyle Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Massachusetts Public Pension Funds
Represented By: Bryan Andrew Wood
Represented By: Christopher J. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alameda County Employees Retirement Association
Represented By: Gerald H. Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cheryl Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?