Raghavendra v. National Labor Relations Board et al
Plaintiff: Rajagopala Sampath Raghavendra
Defendant: National Labor Relations Board, Celeste J. Mattina, The Trustees of Columbia University, Lee C. Bollinger and Laura D. Barbieri
Case Number: 1:2008cv08120
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: John G. Koeltl
Presiding Judge: Henry B. Pitman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Pitman's R&R in its entirety and upholds the Settlement Agreement. The Court GRANTS Stober's motion to strike immaterial or impertinent matter on its docket and directs the Clerk of Court to strike t he following documents: In the 06 Civ. 6841 action: Docket #'s: 107-08; 114-15; 121; 124; 127; 130-34; In the 08 Civ. 8120 action: Docket #'s: 61; 68-69; and In the 09 Civ. 0019 action: Docket #'s: 45-46 The Court further ORDERS Raghav endra to cease filing papers containing immaterial and inappropriate statements and ad hominem remarks about Stober. Further, the Court exercises its supplemental jurisdiction over the Fee Dispute and finds that the Retainer is valid and enforceable. Finally, the Court finds that Stober has earned an award equal to 1/3 (33.33%) of the monies which Columbia agreed to pay to settle the dispute. Pursuant to the Settlement Agreement, Raghavendra must tender to Columbia properly executed "d ocuments that are necessary to accomplish withdrawal" of all claims; he must tender to Columbia release of all claims against all defendants in all actions and the EEOC Charge; and he must tender any and all documents reasonably demanded by defe ndant Columbia and end this matter. Upon presentation of such documents, Columbia must pay the settlement amount, as stated in the July 30,2009 Settlement Agreement, "less applicable taxes and withholding as wages". Such payment should be m ade to Louis D. Stober, Jr. as attorney, who may deduct the fee specified in the Retainer and remit the balance to Raghavendra. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close as moot all pending motions in the three above-referenced cases (06 Civ. 6841; 08 Civ. 8120; 09 Civ. 0019). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/19/2010) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tve) Modified on 2/23/2010 (tve).
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: For all the foregoing reasons, I respectfully recommend that the NLRB Defendants' and Barbieri's motions to dismiss (Docket Items 25 and 43 in 08 Civ. 8120 (PAC)(HBP)) be granted. FAILURE TO OBJECT WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS WILL RESULT IN A WAIVER OF OBJECTIONS AND WILL PRECLUDE APPELLATE REVIEW. Objections to R&R due by 9/14/2009 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 8/27/2009) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Accordingly, for all the reasons set forth above, Irespectfully recommend that the Columbia Defendants' application for an Order directing that plaintiff refrain from having any direct contact with Lee Bollinger, Robert Kasdin and Jane Booth be denied in all respects. Objections to R&R due by 5/15/2009 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/28/09) Copies Mailed by Chambers.(db)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raghavendra v. National Labor Relations Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajagopala Sampath Raghavendra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Labor Relations Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celeste J. Mattina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trustees of Columbia University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee C. Bollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura D. Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?