Richard Green (Fine Paintings) v. McClendon et al
Plaintiff: Richard Green (Fine Paintings)
Defendant: Mary Alice McClendon
Case Number: 1:2008cv08496
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: James C. Francis
Presiding Judge: John G. Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is plain that there are possibilities for the parties to resolve the dispute between themselves, but that is for the parties. At this point, the plaintiff has established its entitlement to the proposed judgment. The Court will order that the judgment proposed by the plaintiff be entered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/13/2010) (jpo)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is granted and Ms. McClendon's motion for summary judgment is denied. The Clerk is directed to close these motions. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/17/10) (cd)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated above, the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is granted and Ms. McClendon's motion for summary judgment is denied. The Clerk is directed to close these motions. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/8/10) (djc)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 41 Motion to Dismiss. The parties are directed to inform the Court by 8/28/09 of their proposed subsequent scheduling, whether the parties consent to trial before the magistrate judge, and whether reference to the magistrate judge for purposes of settlement would be useful. The Clerk of this Court is directed to close Docket No. 41. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/13/09) (cd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Green (Fine Paintings) v. McClendon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Green (Fine Paintings)
Represented By: Ronald Wolf Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Alice McClendon
Represented By: J. Carter Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?