Steavens et al v. Electronic Data Systems Corporation
Plaintiff: Stephen Lenker, Daniel Hein, James J McCann, Lawrence E Pilon, John P Confar, Ahmad Habbal, John W.S. Acheson, Danny D Harber, Jamie P. Sheridan, Scott Alan Slaith, Jamel Toombs, Mary G Ham, Darrell Williams, Andrew Campbell, Charles Mills, Brian Smith, Tamura L. Goldberg, Charles Myles, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Paul Barrix, Adam Klier, Chester Lucas, Milton Douglas Fugitt, Bryan Korth, Michael Snyder, Rod Deluhery, Robert Schwab, Steven Ashley-Lassen, Jennifer Hightower, Julie Trombly and Brian D. Steavens
Defendant: Electronic Data Systems Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv10409
Filed: December 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Michael H Dolinger
Referring Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2015 Terminate Transcript Deadlines. (rjm)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. The Court hereby approves the proposed Settlement Agreement and finds that the settlement is fair, reasonable and adequate to all members of the Salva Settlement Classes and the Cunningham Opt-Ins, and as further specified herein. In accordance with the Settlement Agreement, Defendants shall provide funds to the Claims Administrator so that the SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS for AUTHORIZED CLAIMANTS are mailed within twenty (20) days of the "FINAL EFFECTIVE DATE" as defined in the Settlement Agreement. Class Counsel shall be awarded $3,800,000.00 for fair and reasonable attorneys' fees, as well as $245,832.54 for fair and reasonable costs and expenses incurred in the prosecution of this litigation, and as further set forth. This Court hereby dismisses all claims released in the Settlement Agreement of the Parties on the merits and with prejudice ("RELEASED CLAIMS" as defined in the Settlement Agreement) and without costs to any of the parties as against any other settling party, except as provided in the Settlement Agreement. The Court retains jurisdiction over this action and the parties to administer, supervise, interpret and enforce the Settlement Agreement and this Order, and as further set forth in this Order on Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement.Granting (357) Motion for Settlement in case 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD; Granting (267) Motion for Settlement in case 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD; Granting (57) Motion for Settlement in case 1:14-cv-07484-LAP. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/16/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 1:14-cv-07484-LAP (rjm)
May 20, 2015 Filing 269 DECLARATION of Seth R. Lesser in Support re: (57 in 1:14-cv-07484-LAP) MOTION for Settlement to Approve Class and Collective Action Settlement and for other relief.. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 1:14-cv-07484-LAP(Lesser, Seth)
May 20, 2015 Filing 268 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (57 in 1:14-cv-07484-LAP) MOTION for Settlement to Approve Class and Collective Action Settlement and for other relief. . Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 1:14-cv-07484-LAP(Lesser, Seth)
May 20, 2015 Filing 267 MOTION for Settlement to Approve Class and Collective Action Settlement and for other relief. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 1:14-cv-07484-LAP(Lesser, Seth)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting (355) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to send supplemental notice to certain settlement class members, for extension of time to file papers in support of final approval and for a consolidated brief in case 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD; granting (265) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to send supplemental notice to certain settlement class members, for extension of time to file papers in support of final approval and for a consolidated brief in case 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD; granting (55) Letter Motion for Extension to send supplemental notice to certain settlement class members, for extension of time to file papers in support of final approval and for a consolidated brief of Time in case 1:14-cv-07484-LAP. The brief shall be no longer than 25 pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/11/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 1:14-cv-07484-LAP (kko)
May 7, 2015 Filing 265 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to send supplemental notice to certain settlement class members, for extension of time to file papers in support of final approval and for a consolidated brief addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Seth R. Lesser dated May 7, 2015. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment - Proposed Supplemental Notice)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 1:14-cv-07484-LAP(Lesser, Seth)
November 4, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Approval Hearing set for 6/8/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 1:14-cv-07484-UA (rjm)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER AUTHORIZING NOTICE OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF FINAL APPROVAL HEARING. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Court has jurisdiction over the claims alleged in the Litigation, the Parties in the Litigation, and the implementation and administration of the Parties' Settlement Agreement. The Court grants the Salva Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint ("SAC"), and the SAC shall be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. On the basis of the findings set forth below, the Court hereby certifies a plaintiff class_pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 for settlement purposes only in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement, as further set forth. A Final Approval Hearing shall be held before this Court on the 8th day of June 2015 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 12A of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007-1312 to determine (a) whether the settlement set forth in the Settlement Agreement is fair, reasonable, adequate, and in the best interests of the Settlement Classes; (b) whether a Final Judgment as provided in the Settlement Agreement should be entered granting final approval of the settlement; (c) whether, and in what amount, attorneys' fees and expenses should be awarded to Class Counsel; and (d) whether, and in what amount, Service Payments should be made to Named Plaintiffs, and as further set forth. Granting (350) Motion to Approve in case 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD; Granting (260) Motion to Approve in case 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD; Granting (48) Motion to Approve in case 1:14-cv-07484-UA. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/3/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 1:14-cv-07484-UA (rjm)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER GRANTING CONSOLIDATION. The parties have jointly moved this Court pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures for an order to consolidate this action, Cunningham/Steavens, with another case now pending before this Court, Salva v. Hewlett-Packard Company, Case No. I :14-cv-07484-UA. The sole purpose for the requested consolidation is to facilitate a consolidated settlement of Cunningham/Steavens and Salva, where allegations of certain wage-hour violations under the Fair Labor Standards Act, 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq. and state laws have been made. For purposes of settlement only, and in the interest of the efficient administration of justice, the parties' motion is hereby GRANTED and this matter, Cunningham/Steavens, is CONSOLIDATED with Salva under the Cunningham/Steavens docket number. Granting (348) Motion to Consolidate Cases; Granting (348) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD; Granting (258) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD; Granting (46) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:14-cv-07484-UA. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/3/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 1:14-cv-07484-UA (rjm)
September 19, 2014 Filing 262 DECLARATION of Seth R. Lesser in Support re: (260 in 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 350 in 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD) MOTION to Approve Parties' Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Collective and Class Action .. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Lesser, Seth)
September 19, 2014 Filing 261 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (350 in 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 260 in 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD) MOTION to Approve Parties' Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Collective and Class Action . . Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Lesser, Seth)
September 19, 2014 Filing 260 MOTION to Approve Parties' Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Collective and Class Action . Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Lesser, Seth)
September 19, 2014 Filing 259 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (258 in 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 258 in 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-cv-03530, 08-cv-10409, 14-cv-07484 . . Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Lesser, Seth)
September 19, 2014 Filing 258 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-cv-03530, 08-cv-10409, 14-cv-07484 . Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Lesser, Seth)
September 10, 2014 Filing 257 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua B. Waxman on behalf of Electronic Data Systmes Corp.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Waxman, Joshua)
September 10, 2014 Filing 256 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua B. Waxman on behalf of Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Waxman, Joshua)
March 27, 2014 Filing 255 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian Lewis Bromberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Bromberg Law Office, P.C., 26 Broadway, 21st Floor, New York, New York, 10004, 2122487906. (Bromberg, Brian)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #245 Motion for Paul Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/9/2013) (djc)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE: granting (333) Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Kyra N. Hild in this matter. (210 in 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD) Notice of Appearance, (187 in 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 247 in 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD) Notice of Appearance, in case 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD; granting (252) Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Kyra N. Hild in case 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(djc) Modified on 4/10/2013 (djc).
October 12, 2012 Filing 252 MOTION to Withdraw appearnce of Kyra Hild. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Lesser, Seth)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER: NOW THEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to withdraw [Dkt. No. 261 in 06 Civ. 3530; Dkt. No. 197 in 08 Civ. 10409] is GRANTED. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, the law firms of Klafter Olsen & Lesser LLP, Pitt, McGehee, Palmer, Rivers & Golden, P.C., Bromberg Law Office, P.C., Hepworth, Gershbaum & Roth, PLLC, and Berger & Gottlieb are hereby relieved as counsel for the Plaintiffs listed in Appendices A, B, and C to the motion to withdraw. Because the parties have stipulated that claims that fall outside the applicable statute of limitations period should be dismissed with prejudice see Dkt. No. 264 in 06 Civ. 3530] and because the non-responsive Plaintiffs have not provided any documentation to refute Defendant is position that their claims are untimely, the claims of those Plaintiffs listed in Appendices A, B, and C are hereby dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(js) Modified on 9/13/2012 (js).
September 7, 2012 Filing 250 NOTICE of withdrawal of opt-in plaintiff Colette Hawke. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Rudich, Fran)
September 7, 2012 Filing 249 NOTICE of withdrawal of opt-in plaintiff Sam Abraham Moses. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Rudich, Fran)
September 7, 2012 Filing 248 NOTICE of withdrawal of opt-in plaintiff Paul Cirielli. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Rudich, Fran)
September 7, 2012 Filing 247 NOTICE of withdrawal of opt-in plaintiff Leroy Zine. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Rudich, Fran)
September 7, 2012 Filing 246 NOTICE of withdrawal of opt-in plaintiff Sarah A. Clawson-Schuch. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Rudich, Fran)
August 31, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (321 in 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 245 in 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD) MOTION for Paul Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(pgu)
August 31, 2012 Filing 245 MOTION for Paul Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(pgu)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 244 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' RULE 23 CLASS AND STATE LAW CLAIMS: that as to the named Plaintiffs in each such action, Counts II, III, IV, V, VI of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint in Steavens v. Electronic Data Systems Corp., Case No. 08-CV-10409, Dkt No. 32, and the Second, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Claims of Relief of the Amended Complaint in Cunningham v. Electronic Data Systems Corp., Case No. 06-CV-3530, Dkt No. 72 should be dismissed, with prejudice, in accordance with Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, without costs or attorneys' fees to any party, and that Plaintiffs withdraw their assertions of classes under Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for any such claims in these " complaints. The Court, upon finding that the parties have agreed that Plaintiffs' state law claims are to be dismissed, SO ORDERS the dismissal with prejudice of Counts II, III, IV, V, and VI of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint in Steavens v. Electronic Data Systems Corp., Case No. 08-CV-10409, Dkt No. 32, and the Second, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Claims of Relief of the Amended Complaint in Cunningham v. Electronic Data Systems Corp., Case No. 06-CV-3530, Dkt No. 72. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/28/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(pl)
July 30, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Fran L. Rudich to RE-FILE Document (243 in 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD, 319 in 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD) Consent to Become Party Plaintiff. ERROR(S): Incorrect filer. Filer should be Malcolm Haffie. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(ka)
July 27, 2012 Filing 243 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Rudich, Fran) Modified on 7/30/2012 (ka).
July 12, 2012 Filing 242 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Rudich, Fran)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING GAYLENE ANDERSON: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties in these actions, that Defendant withdraws, without prejudice to renewal, that portion of Defendant's November 14, 2011 Motion to Dismiss Disputed Opt-Ins (Steavens Dkt No. 184) which seeks to dismiss Gaylene Anderson's claims, on the condition that Ms. Anderson Will appear for a deposition in this case. This deposition will not count towards the 60 depositions which the Court thus far has granted to Defendant. In light of this agreement Plaintiffs withdraw their Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Disputed Opt-In Gaylene Anderson (Steavens Dkt. No. 212, 213, and 214). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(ft)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' FLSA CLAIMS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties in these actions, that plaintiffs Reza Beha and Ganeshan Arcot do not want to proceed with the Fair Labor Standards Act claims of this action against the Defendant, and that those claims should be withdrawn, discontinued, and dismissed, without prejudice, in accordance with Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, without costs or attorneys' fees to any party. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(ft)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 239 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' FLSA CLAIMS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties in this action that the Fair Labor Standards Act claims of the plaintiffs Rita Gulley, Leslie Kelley, Trent Rice, Robert Lytle, Gisel Matthews, John Bushnell and Donald Miller against the Defendant Electronic Data Systems Corp. are outside of the statute of limitations and that those claims be withdrawn, discontinued and dismissed, with prejudice, in accordance with Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, without costs or attorneys' fees to any party. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(ft)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' FLSA CLAIMS: The following opt-ins listed herein, whose consents were inadvertently not filed with this Court prior to the September 9, 2011 deadline, shall be deemed to have been filed on May 31, 2011, for purposes of the statute of limitations of their Fair Labor Standards Act claims. In addition, it is stipulated and agreed that the consent of opt-in Margaret Loomis, which also was inadvertently not filed by the Court's September 9, 2011 deadline, shall be deemed to have been filed on September 9, 2011. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(ft)
June 28, 2012 Filing 237 NOTICE of of withdrawal of opt-in plaintiff Kenyon S. Sylvester. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Rudich, Fran)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Lisa A. Schreter and Fran L. Rudich dated 6/22/12 re: Counsel writes on behalf of the parties to request a one week extension to advise the Court as to whether or not they are able to come to an agreement on the issue listed herein. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/25/2012) (mro)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER: This matter having been heard by the Court for a status conference on June 4, 2012, with counsel for all parties being present, the Court hereby enters the following ORDER: On or before June 22, 2012, each party will submit a letter to the Court no longer than 3 pages explaining their respective positions regarding the withdrawals and dismissals of opt-in consents and whether such dismissals should be with or without prejudice. The parties will meet and confer regarding ESI and the scope of discovery. If the parties cannot reach agreement on any of the disputed issues, each party will submit a letter to the Court no longer than 3 pages stating their respective positions on the disputed issues by June 22, 2012. Defendant will proceed with completing 60 depositions (30 selected randomly and 30 selected by Defendant) of opt in plaintiffs by August 31, 2012. Plaintiffs will also complete their depositions of corporate and fact witnesses by August 31, 2012. Both parties have the right to seek more depositions at a later date by petitioning the Court. Plaintiffs will file an Amended Complaint to reflect the revised class definitions contained in their email of April 26, 2012, by July 5, 2012. The Court will hold a conference with the parties on September 12, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. for the purpose of addressing the status of the case, including the need for additional discovery (e.g., whether additional depositions and/or expert witnesses are warranted) and to set the expert disclosure deadline. ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2012., Deposition due by 8/31/2012., Status Conference set for 9/12/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/18/2012) (mro)
June 6, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Status Conference held on 6/6/2012. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(cd)
June 4, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Status Conference held on 6/4/2012. Parties to submit a proposed order. (djc)
May 30, 2012 Filing 234 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from John A. Ybarra dated 5/24/2012 re: The parties respectfully requests a status conference. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel shall appear for a conference in Courtroom 12A on June 4 at 9:00 a.m. ( Status Conference set for 6/4/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/30/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(jfe)
May 8, 2012 Filing 233 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael John Palitz on behalf of Kelley Cunningham(individually) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Palitz, Michael)
April 24, 2012 Filing 232 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hewlett-Packard Company for Electronic Data Systems Corporation. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation.(Dawson, Todd)
April 17, 2012 Filing 231 NOTICE of of withdrawal of opt-in plaintiff Mark Powley.. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-LAP-MHD, 1:08-cv-10409-LAP-MHD(Rudich, Fran)
April 13, 2012 Filing 230 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Richard J. Holwell is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
April 13, 2012 Filing 229 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger, for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute. Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck no longer referred to the case. (pgu)
April 13, 2012 Filing 228 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (pgu)
April 11, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Status Conference held on 4/11/2012. Judges Decision: During discussion of discovery disputes, parties remarked that HP is parent of defendants EDS. Accordingly, I advised the parties I needed to recuse because of ownership of HP stock. Case will be transferred to another Magistrate Judge (js)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER RESCHEDULING TIME OF STATUS CONFERENCE: The status conference originally scheduled for 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 11, 2012 is rescheduled to start at 2:00 p.m. on the same date, before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 4/10/2012) Copies Sent Via ECF By Chambers. (js)
April 9, 2012 Filing 226 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp..Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Ybarra, John)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 CLAWBACK STIPULATION AND FRE 502(D) AND (E) ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 4/2/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(lmb)
March 27, 2012 Filing 224 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Clawback Stipulation and FRE 502(d) and (e) Order)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Ybarra, John)
March 21, 2012 Filing 223 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (209 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Defendant's Objections to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck's Orders of February 15 and 22, 2012. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Ybarra, John)
March 21, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/11/2012 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(lmb)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on JOINT ELECTRONIC SUBMISSION NO. ONE (1) AND ORDER: 1. Approved. 2. The 402(d) order was not attached and needs to be submitted. 3. The 3/23 conf. is adjourned at the parties' request, to 4/11 at 5 PM. 4. The parties are reminded that the 8/31 discovery cutoff date is not likely to be extended. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 3/21/2012) (lmb)
March 20, 2012 Filing 221 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp..Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Ybarra, John)
March 15, 2012 Filing 220 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff Robert Winslow. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
March 15, 2012 Filing 219 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff Andrew Loggia. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
March 15, 2012 Filing 218 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff Denise Piccinelli. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
March 15, 2012 Filing 217 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff Arden Roberts. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
March 14, 2012 Filing 216 RESPONSE re: #209 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Defendant's Objections to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck's Orders of February 15 and 22, 2012. Document filed by Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Lesser, Seth)
March 9, 2012 Filing 215 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Lisa A. Schreter and Fran Rudich dated 3/6/2012 re: Both parties request a brief two-week postponement to March 20, 2012 to complete and submit the Joint Stipulated ESI Protocol. We also accordingly request that the currently scheduled March 13 status hearing similarly be briefly postponed until after the March 20th submission of the Joint Stipulated ESI Protocol. ENDORSEMENT: Extension for Joint ESI Protocol to March 20, 2012 approved. Status conference rescheduled on March 23, 2012 at 10:00 am., ( Status Conference set for 3/23/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 3/9/2012) (lmb)
March 8, 2012 Filing 214 DECLARATION of Seth Lesser in Support re: (212 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP) Memorandum of Law in Opposition, (213 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
March 8, 2012 Filing 213 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
March 8, 2012 Filing 212 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (184 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP) Brief,, (185 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP) Brief,. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
March 8, 2012 Filing 211 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Seth R. Lesser dated 3/7/2012 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs request clarification that the Court has not changed Judge Holwell's ruling - namely, that EDS can commence depositions of no more than sixty opt-ins and, at some point thereafter, it can go to the Court to request more. ENDORSEMENT: The Court does not believe its 2/15/12 ruling requires clarification. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 3/8/2012) (ft)
March 6, 2012 Filing 210 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyra Naomi Hild on behalf of Brian D. Steavens (Hild, Kyra)
February 29, 2012 Filing 209 NOTICE of Defendant's Objections To Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck's Orders of February 15 and 22, 2012 re: Status Conference,, #204 Transcript,,. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ybarra, John)
February 24, 2012 Filing 208 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-In Jon Miller. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
February 24, 2012 Filing 207 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-In Ruth Pine. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Lesser, Seth)
February 24, 2012 Filing 206 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-In Claudio Hexsel. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Lesser, Seth)
February 21, 2012 Filing 205 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/15/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 21, 2012 Filing 204 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 2/15/2012 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 15, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Status Conference held on 2/15/2012. Defendant limited to approx.. 60 depos. Paper discovery only to those 60, not 300 or 3000 (total plaintiff of opt-in plaintiffs, approx..) See transcripts of rulings. Plaintiff will be limited to its plaintiff witnesses only to those in the 60 or that plaintiff discloses to Defendant so Defendant can depose. Damages discovery held off for now. Disc. Cutoff 8/31 (expert reports 7/9). Plaintiff revised class definition due 4/16. Status conf. to be held before Judge Peck on 3/13 at 9:30 AM Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(pl)
February 15, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/13/2012 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(pl)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. Class definition by plaintiffs' counsel due April 16, 2012. 2. All fact and expert discovery must be completed by August 31, 2012. Expert reports must be served by July 9, 2012 (except as to damages). The parties shall discuss any issues with respect to electronic discovery, complete the Joint Electronic Discovery Submission (Ex. B) to the extent applicable to the case and submit it to the Court by March 6, 2012. 3. A status conference will be held before the undersigned on March 13, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 20D (500 Pearl Street). ( Expert Discovery due by 8/31/2012., Fact Discovery due by 8/31/2012.), ( Status Conference set for 3/13/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck.) Copies by ECF (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 2/15/2012) (js)
February 14, 2012 Filing 202 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-In Nicholas Pagano. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Seth R. Lesser dated 2/2/2012 re: Along with co-counsel, we represent the Plaintiffs in the above-represented matter. We write, with Defendant's agreement, regarding the Court Conference currently scheduled for February 2, 2012. For the reasons set forth below, both parties believe that the Conference should be adjourned ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned and 30 days granted to file opposition. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/7/2012) (js)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' FLSA CLAIMS: the parties in the above-captioned actions, that the Fair Labor Standards Act claims of the plaintiffs listed in Appendix A are outside of the statute of limitations and that those claims be withdrawn, discontinued and dismissed, with prejudice, in accordance with Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, without costs or attorneys' fees to any party. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/27/2012) (pl)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 2/15/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 1/27/2012) (ft)
January 20, 2012 Filing 198 DECLARATION of Fran L.Rudich in Support re: (197 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP) MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel for A Number of Opt-In Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
January 20, 2012 Filing 197 MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel for A Number of Opt-In Plaintiffs. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran)
January 20, 2012 Filing 196 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #197) - MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel for A Number of Opt-In Plaintiffs. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran) Modified on 1/23/2012 (ldi).
January 13, 2012 Filing 195 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/9/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 13, 2012 Filing 194 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/9/2011 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 12, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Fran L. Rudich to RE-FILE Document (193 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP, 256 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP) MOTION to Withdraw (190 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP) Order, As Counsel for A Number of Opt-In Plaintiffs. MOTION to Withdraw (190 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP) Order, As Counsel for A Number of Opt-In Plaintiffs. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(ldi)
January 12, 2012 Filing 193 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Withdraw (190 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP) Order,,, As Counsel for A Number of Opt-In Plaintiffs. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH-AJP, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH-AJP(Rudich, Fran) Modified on 1/13/2012 (ldi).
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: Discovery Disputes raised in letters of November 4, 2011. Referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/11/2012) (mro)
January 4, 2012 Filing 191 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Opt-In Scott Alan Slaith. Document filed by Scott Alan Slaith. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER: In a letter dated December 9, 2011, Klafter, Olsen & Lessler LLP ("Klafter") have asked this court for leave to withdraw as counsel for sixty-six non-responsive plaintiffs. Klafter may move to withdraw as to these plaintiffs. Klafter shall attempt to serve its motion papers on the non-responsive plaintiffs, who will be given thirty days from the date of the motion to obtain new representation and oppose the motion, or otherwise file opposition pro se. Upon the expiration of this thirty-day period, the court will grant Klafter's motion as to all non-objecting plaintiffs, and then proceed to address defendant's motion to dismiss as to all disputed opt-in plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/3/2012) (lmb)
December 19, 2011 Filing 189 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Fran L. Rudich dated 12/19/2011 re: We represent the Plaintiffs in the above-referenced actions and write, with the consent of Defendants, to request an adjournment of the Court conference presently scheduled for December 20, 2011 at 11:30 a.m., due to a scheduling conflict of counsel. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned to February 2, 2012 at 10:30 AM.( Status Conference set for 2/2/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/19/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(lmb)
December 12, 2011 Filing 188 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Fran L. Rudich dated 11/28/2011 re: Plaintiff respectfully request, and defendant agrees to the request that the Court schedule a conference to address the various other outstanding discovery issues that have been previously set before the Court in prior communication, and to discuss the briefing regarding the disputed opt-in plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: A conference in this matter will be held on December 20 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 17B. ( Status Conference set for 12/20/2011 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Holwell.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/8/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jfe)
December 9, 2011 Filing 187 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - WRONG PARTY WAS SLECTED - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyra Naomi Hild on behalf of Kelley Cunningham(individually) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Hild, Kyra) Modified on 3/6/2012 (gp).
November 29, 2011 Filing 186 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Scott Hepworth on behalf of Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(Hepworth, Marc)
November 21, 2011 Filing 185 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: (184 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 244 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH) Brief,, In Support of Motion to Dismiss Disputed Opt-Ins. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Ybarra, John)
November 14, 2011 Filing 184 BRIEF of Defendant Electronic Data Systems Corporation In Support of Motion To Dismiss Disputed Opt-Ins. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Supplement Attachments to Exhibit C (part 1), #5 Supplement Attachments to Exhibit C (part 2), #6 Supplement Attachments to Exhibit C (part 3), #7 Supplement Attachments to Exhibit C (part 4), #8 Supplement Attachments to Exhibit C (part 5), #9 Supplement Attachments to Exhibit C (part 6), #10 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Ybarra, John)
November 14, 2011 Filing 183 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #247) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fran L. Rudich on behalf of Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran) Modified on 12/22/2011 (lb).
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 SEPTEMBER 9, 2011 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: This matter has been heard by the Court for a status conference on September 9, 2011, counsel for all parties being present, and the Court being fully advised in the premises, the Court hereby enters the following Order. Plaintiffs' Motion in George v. EDS: Plaintiffs' Motion to amend the complaint in George v. Electronic Data Systems, Case No. 1:10-cv-01155-RJH, and sever that action from Steavens v. Electronic Data Systems and Cunningham v. Electronic Data Systems, is granted. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/4/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH (ab)
August 29, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony J Pantuso, III on behalf of Gregory Brousseau, John Confar, Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Robert Schwab, Michael Snyder Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(Pantuso, Anthony)
August 19, 2011 Filing 180 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
August 15, 2011 Filing 179 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
August 11, 2011 Filing 178 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
August 5, 2011 Filing 177 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
July 27, 2011 Filing 176 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
July 21, 2011 Filing 175 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
July 21, 2011 Filing 174 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Seth Lesser dated 7/18/11 re: Request to adjourn the 7/28/11 conference. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned to 9/9/11 at 10:30 am. (Status Conference reset for 9/9/2011 at 10:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/19/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(cd)
July 20, 2011 Filing 173 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
July 18, 2011 Filing 172 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
July 11, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/28/2011 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(djc)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER. The parties shall appear for a status conference in the above-captioned cases on July 28, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/7/11). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(djc)
July 11, 2011 Filing 170 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
July 8, 2011 Filing 169 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 29, 2011 Filing 168 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 28, 2011 Filing 167 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 24, 2011 Filing 166 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 23, 2011 Filing 165 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 22, 2011 Filing 164 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 17, 2011 Filing 163 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 16, 2011 Filing 162 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 15, 2011 Filing 161 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 14, 2011 Filing 160 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 11, 2011 Filing 159 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
June 11, 2011 Filing 158 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
June 9, 2011 Filing 157 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
June 8, 2011 Filing 156 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
June 8, 2011 Filing 155 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
June 7, 2011 Filing 154 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216b. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
June 7, 2011 Filing 153 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 usc 216b. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms, #2 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
June 7, 2011 Filing 152 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Jamie P. Sheridan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 7, 2011 Filing 151 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by John W.S. Acheson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
June 4, 2011 Filing 150 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
June 4, 2011 Filing 149 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
June 2, 2011 Filing 148 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
June 2, 2011 Filing 147 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
May 31, 2011 Filing 146 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
May 27, 2011 Filing 145 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
May 26, 2011 Filing 144 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216b. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
May 25, 2011 Filing 143 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 USC 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
May 24, 2011 Filing 142 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
May 20, 2011 Filing 141 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 19, 2011 Filing 140 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 18, 2011 Filing 139 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 17, 2011 Filing 138 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2011 Filing 137 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2011 Filing 136 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 12, 2011 Filing 135 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 11, 2011 Filing 134 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 10, 2011 Filing 133 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 9, 2011 Filing 132 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 6, 2011 Filing 131 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 5, 2011 Filing 130 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 3, 2011 Filing 129 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
April 28, 2011 Filing 128 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
April 26, 2011 Filing 127 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
April 26, 2011 Filing 126 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
April 26, 2011 Filing 125 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms, #2 Exhibit Consent Forms Continued)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
April 23, 2011 Filing 124 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms, #2 Exhibit Consent Forms Continued, #3 Exhibit Consent Forms Continued)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
April 22, 2011 Filing 123 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
April 20, 2011 Filing 122 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Consent Forms, #2 Exhibit 2-Consent Forms Continued, #3 Exhibit 3-Consent Forms Continued, #4 Exhibit 4-Consent Forms Continued, #5 Exhibit 5-Consent Forms Continued)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
April 15, 2011 Filing 121 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b). Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Part 1, #2 Exhibit A- Part 2)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
April 12, 2011 Filing 120 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b).. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Lesser, Seth)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Seth R. Lesser dated 3/15/2011 re: This letter, sent at the suggestion of your clerk, jointly requests Your Honor to clarify a matter relating to the Fair Labor Standards Act collective action notice in this case, which notice was approved by Your Honor's order dated January 31,2011 and docketed February 7, 2011. (Docket # 175). Inasmuch as the parties have agreed on all other aspects of the notice and the claims administrator is ready to send it we would most respectfully appreciate Your Honor's expeditious attention to this matter. For reference, a copy of the form of notice and form of consent that the two parties agreed upon and believe that the Court approved (based upon their submissions to it and the Court's order) are attached as Exhibit A hereto as set forth in this order. ENDORSEMENT: The notice shall be updated to allow submission via fax. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/23/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(js)
February 28, 2011 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cary S. McGehee on behalf of Paul Barrix, Gregory Brousseau, Andrew Campbell, John Confar, Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Milton Douglas Fugitt, Ahmad Habbal, Mary G Ham, Danny D Harber, Jennifer Hightower, Adam Klier, Bryan Korth, James J McCann, Charles Mills, Charles Myles, Lawrence Pillon, Robert Schwab, Brian Smith, Michael Snyder, Jamel Toombs, Julie Trombly, Darrell Williams, Steven Ashley-Lassen, John P Confar, Rod Deluhery, Tamura L. Goldberg, Mary G Ham, Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Chester Lucas, Lawrence E Pilon, Brian D. Steavens, Darrell Williams Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(McGehee, Cary)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: The Court also finds that plaintiffs proposed language regarding the use of sampling in collective action discovery is unnecessary. A simple statement that opt-in plaintiffs may have to participate in pre-trial discovery is sufficient. The opt-in period shall be sixty days. Plaintiff has requested that defendant's counsel should not be identified in the notice, citing cases that raise concerns about the purposes for such identification. Accordingly, defendant's counsel shall not be identified in the notice. Defendant has requested that the notice not solicit social security numbers from individuals, citing cases that raise various privacy concerns. The notice shall not solici social security numbers of opt-in plaintiffs. Plaintiff's counsel requests to include a self-addressed, stamped envelope with the notice. Defendant offers no reason why such an envelope should not be included. Accordingly, plaintiff's counsel may include a self-addressed, stamped envelope. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/31/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jpo)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from John Ybarra dated 1/3/11 re: Request for a 7 day extension from 1/4 to 1/11/11 to determine if we can move towards agreement on either a single proposed notice, or, if not, to minimize the differences between each Party's respective proposed notice. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/11/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(cd)
January 11, 2011 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Support re: (87 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 140 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class. Pursuant to the Courts Order of December 14, 2010, Plaintiff's Hereby Submit Their Memorandum in Support of its Form Proposed Order and Consent Form. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- proposed notice, #2 Exhibit B- Avis order, #3 Exhibit C- Staples order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(Lesser, Seth)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS in part plaintiffs motion to certify [06cv3530 Docket No. 140, 08cv10409 Docket No. 87] this action as a collective action. The parties are directed to confer about the form and content of the notice that will be sent to potential opt-in plaintiffs. A joint proposed notice shall be submitted to this Court within three weeks of this opinion. If the parties cannot agree on a form of notice, they shall submit letter memoranda by that date. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/13/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jpo)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED ORDER: In an Order dated April 15, 2010 #144 , the Court denied defendants' motions to deny class certification because they were not contemplated by the Court's March 2, 2009 and January 29, 2010 scheduling orders. That Order neglected to refer to all of defendants' then-pending motions to deny class certification. Accordingly, that Order is hereby amended to include all such motions [06 Civ. 3530: 136, 138, 08 Civ. 10409: 85] as denied without prejudice to re-filing after the Court decides plaintiffs' certification motion #140 . ORDER denying (136) Motion; denying (138) Motion in case 1:06-cv-03530-RJH; denying (85) Motion in case 1:08-cv-10409-RJH. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/30/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(db)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF LISA A. SCHRETER ON WRITTEN MOTION: that Lisa A. Schreter is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Electronic Data Systems Corp. in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Additionally, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password at nysd.uscourts.gov. Counsel shall also forward the pro hac vice fee of$25.00 to the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/1/10) (laq)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF STEPHANIE SEAY KELLY ON WRITTEN MOTION: that Stephanie Seay Kelly is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Electronic Data Systems Corp. in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Additionally, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password at nysd.uscourts.gov. Counsel shall also forward the pro hac vice fee of $25.00 to the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/1/10) (laq)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MELODIE CRAFT ON WRITTEN MOTION: that Melodie Craft is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Electronic Data Systems Corp. in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Additionally, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password at nysd.uscourts.gov. Counsel shall also forward the pro hac vice fee of $25.00 to the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/1/10) (laq)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JOHN A. YBARRA ON WRITTEN MOTION: that John A. Ybarra is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Electronic Data Systems Corp. in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Additionally, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password at nysd.uscourts.gov. Counsel shall also forward the pro hac vice fee of $25.00 to the Clerk of Court.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/1/10) (laq)
September 9, 2010 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #108 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #107 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #106 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #105 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $100.00, paid on 09/01/2010, Receipt Number 913557. (jd)
September 2, 2010 Filing 108 MOTION for John A. Ybarra to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation.(mbe)
September 2, 2010 Filing 107 MOTION for Stephanie Seay Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation.(mbe)
September 2, 2010 Filing 106 MOTION for Lisa A. Schreter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation.(mbe)
September 2, 2010 Filing 105 MOTION for Melodie Craft to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation.(mbe)
September 1, 2010 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary David Shapiro on behalf of Electronic Data Systems Corporation (Shapiro, Gary)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Accordingly, George is hereby consolidated with the already-consolidated Steavens and Cunningham cases, and all proceedings in George are stayed pending resolution of the Steavens plaintiffs' motion for FLSA Seciton 16(b) certification. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/25/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 1:10-cv-01155-RJH(cd)
May 21, 2010 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Seth R. Lesser in Support re: (87 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 140 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Lesser, Seth)
May 21, 2010 Filing 101 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (87 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 140 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens, Steven Ashley-Lassen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Lesser, Seth)
May 7, 2010 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Martin T. Wymer in Opposition re: (87 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 91 - Hoke Declaration, #2 Exhibit 92 - Sorrenson Declaration, #3 Exhibit 93 - Samuelson Declaration, #4 Exhibit 94 - Hoare Declaration, #5 Exhibit 95 - Eng-Hatcher v. Sprint Nextel Corp.)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Wymer, Martin)
May 7, 2010 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Martin T. Wymer in Opposition re: (87 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31 - CCDA Certification Information, #2 Exhibit 32 - CCNA Certification Information, #3 Exhibit 33 - CCNP Certification Information, #4 Exhibit 34 - MCSE Certification Information, #5 Exhibit 35 - Hernandez JSQ, #6 Exhibit 36 - Brousseau JSQ, #7 Exhibit 37 - Goldberg JSQ, #8 Exhibit 38 - Deluhery Answers to Requests for Admissions, #9 Exhibit 39 - I.A. Chart, #10 Exhibit 40 - 2007 Form 10-K, #11 Exhibit 41 - Brousseau Resume, #12 Exhibit 42 - Chart of Deposition and Delaration Testimony, #13 Exhibit 43 - Job Code Descriptions, #14 Exhibit 44 - Miner Declaration, #15 Exhibit 45 - Evans Declaration, #16 Exhibit 46 - Simeon Declaration, #17 Exhibit 47 - Arnold Declaration, #18 Exhibit 48 - Chu Declaration, #19 Exhibit 49 - Shanks Declaration, #20 Exhibit 50 - Bartlett Declaration, #21 Exhibit 51 - Digiovine Declaration, #22 Exhibit 52 - Lawson Declaration, #23 Exhibit 53 - McConnell Declaration, #24 Exhibit 54 - McIlroy Declaration, #25 Exhibit 55 - Woo Declaration, #26 Exhibit 56 - Yonney Declaration, #27 Exhibit 57 - Donovan Declaration, #28 Exhibit 58 - Bates Declaration, #29 Exhibit 59 - Kuhns Declaration, #30 Exhibit 60 - Eldridge Declaration, #31 Exhibit 61 - Amthor Declaration, #32 Exhibit 62 - Bintzler Declaration, #33 Exhibit 63 - Claussen Declaration, #34 Exhibit 64 - Czaja Declaration, #35 Exhibit 65 - Davies Declaration, #36 Exhibit 66 - Hensley Declaration, #37 Exhibit 67 - Kress Declaration, #38 Exhibit 68 - Kukla Declaration, #39 Exhibit 69 - Meendering Declaration, #40 Exhibit 70 - Miller Declaration, #41 Exhibit 71 - Stephenson Declaration, #42 Exhibit 72 - Sullenger Declaration, #43 Exhibit 73 - Tharby Declaration, #44 Exhibit 74 - Smith Declaration, #45 Exhibit 75 - Imwalle Declaration, #46 Exhibit 76 - Allain Declaration, #47 Exhibit 77 - Wheeler Declaration, #48 Exhibit 78 -Wood Declaration, #49 Exhibit 79 - Hervey Declaration, #50 Exhibit 80 - Sim Declaration, #51 Exhibit 81 - Disch Declaration, #52 Exhibit 82 - Alex Declaration, #53 Exhibit 83 - Elkoury Declaration, #54 Exhibit 84 - McGeachy Declaration, #55 Exhibit 85 - Mann Declaration, #56 Exhibit 86 - Briggs Declaration, #57 Exhibit 87 - Stevens Declaration, #58 Exhibit 88 - Cantillon Declaration, #59 Exhibit 89 - Borowicz Declaration, #60 Exhibit 90 - Larson Declaration)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Wymer, Martin)
May 7, 2010 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Martin T. Wymer in Opposition re: (87 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ahlberg Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Barrix Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Brignola Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 4 - Brousseau Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 5 - Confar Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 6 - Deluhery Deposition Exhibits, #7 Exhibit 7 - Geary Deposition Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 8 - Hernandex Deposition Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 9 - Schwab Deposition Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 10 - Conklin Deposition Excerpts, #11 Exhibit 11 - Goldberg Deposition Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 12 - Sanetz Deposition Excerpts, #13 Exhibit 13 - Duley Deposition Excerpts, #14 Exhibit 14 - McCann Deposition Excerpts, #15 Exhibit 15 - Fugitt Deposition Excerpts, #16 Exhibit 16 - Brown Deposition Excerpts, #17 Exhibit 17 - Hightower Deposition Exhibits, #18 Exhibit 18 - Ham Deposition Exhibits, #19 Exhibit 19 - Char Deposition Excerpts, #20 Exhibit 20 - Evans Deposition Excerpts, #21 Exhibit 21 - 2/18/09 Email, #22 Exhibit 22 - 11/13/08 Email, #23 Exhibit 23 - 8/4/04 Email, #24 Exhibit 24 - PRIDE Proposals, #25 Exhibit 25 - 8/14/09 Email, #26 Exhibit 26 - Deluhery Resume, #27 Exhibit 27 - 2005-2006 Emails, #28 Exhibit 28 - 10/9/02 and 12/11/02 Emails, #29 Exhibit 29 - Hightower 2007 Performance Assessment, #30 Exhibit 30 - 1/26/10 Email)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Wymer, Martin)
May 7, 2010 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (87 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Wymer, Martin)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Martin T. Wymer dated 5/4/2010 re: The parties in the above-mentioned consolidated cases hereby respectfully request that this Honorable Court extent the page limit for Defendant EDS Memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Certification (due May 7, 2010) and Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Conditional Certification (due May 21, 2010) by five (5) pages. The parties submit that this request will facilitate a more thorough discussion of the issues presented to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/4/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jmi)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: The parties in all four cases listed in this Order are directed to submit letters to the Court within 30 days explaining the nature of the relationship between the cases and their positions as to whether Azar and George should be consolidated with Cunningham and Steavens. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/28/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(tro)
April 29, 2010 Filing 94 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (110) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:06-cv-03530-RJH; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:08-cv-10409-RJH. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk is directed to close this motion #110 . (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/28/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(tro) Modified on 4/30/2010 (tro).
April 29, 2010 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: (146 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 93 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jmi)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMO ENDORSED granting (121) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:06-cv-03530-RJH; granting (72) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:08-cv-10409-RJH. Application granted. #121 Plaintiffs' counsel are directed to mail a copy of this order to Mr. Campbell. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/28/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jmi)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: Class-certification briefing shall proceed according to the scheduling orders of March 2, 2009 #49 and January 29, 2010 #125 . Defendants' motions to deny class certification [131, 134], which the scheduling orders do not contemplate, are denied without prejudice to re-filing after the Court decides plaintiffs' certification motion #140 . So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/15/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(js)
April 14, 2010 Filing 91 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Brian L. Bromberg dated 4/6/10 re: counsel requests a two-day extension of time, to Friday, April 10, 2010, to file plaintiffs' motion for opt-in collective notice. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/12/10) (djc) Modified on 4/21/2010 (djc).
April 7, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Seth Lesser to E-MAIL Document No. #90 Proposed Order Granting Motion to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. This document is not filed via ECF. (jar)
April 7, 2010 Filing 90 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (Proposed Order) - NOTICE of Proposed Order re: (87 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by John Confar, Robert Schwab, Michael Snyder, Gregory Brousseau, Kelley Cunningham(individually), Milton Douglas Fugitt, Charles Myles, James J McCann, Charles Mills, Bryan Korth, Steven Ashley-Lassen, Adam Klier, Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Chester Lucas, Brian D. Steavens, Darrell Williams, Tamura L. Goldberg, Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Rod Deluhery. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Lesser, Seth) Modified on 4/8/2010 (jar).
April 7, 2010 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Seth R. Lesser in Support re: (87 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 140 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by John Confar, Ahmad Habbal, Lawrence Pillon, Robert Schwab, Michael Snyder, Darrell Williams, Jamel Toombs, Mary G Ham, Paul Barrix, Andrew Campbell, Jennifer Hightower, Brian Smith, Julie Trombly, Gregory Brousseau, Kelley Cunningham(individually), Milton Douglas Fugitt, Danny D Harber, Charles Myles, James J McCann, Charles Mills, Bryan Korth, Steven Ashley-Lassen, Adam Klier, Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Mary G Ham, John P Confar, Lawrence E Pilon, Darrell Williams, Chester Lucas, Brian D. Steavens, Tamura L. Goldberg, Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Rod Deluhery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibits 2-26, #3 Exhibits 27-38, #4 Exhibits 39-48)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Lesser, Seth)
April 7, 2010 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (87 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 140 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class. Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act. Document filed by John Confar, Ahmad Habbal, Lawrence Pillon, Robert Schwab, Michael Snyder, Darrell Williams, Jamel Toombs, Mary G Ham, Paul Barrix, Andrew Campbell, Jennifer Hightower, Brian Smith, Julie Trombly, Gregory Brousseau, Kelley Cunningham(individually), Milton Douglas Fugitt, Danny D Harber, Charles Myles, James J McCann, Charles Mills, Bryan Korth, Steven Ashley-Lassen, Adam Klier, Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Mary G Ham, John P Confar, Lawrence E Pilon, Darrell Williams, Chester Lucas, Brian D. Steavens, Tamura L. Goldberg, Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Rod Deluhery. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Lesser, Seth)
April 7, 2010 Filing 87 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act. Document filed by John Confar, Ahmad Habbal, Lawrence Pillon, Robert Schwab, Michael Snyder, Darrell Williams, Jamel Toombs, Mary G Ham, Paul Barrix, Andrew Campbell, Jennifer Hightower, Brian Smith, Julie Trombly, Gregory Brousseau, Kelley Cunningham(individually), Milton Douglas Fugitt, Danny D Harber, Charles Myles, James J McCann, Charles Mills, Bryan Korth, Steven Ashley-Lassen, Adam Klier, Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Mary G Ham, John P Confar, Lawrence E Pilon, Darrell Williams, Chester Lucas, Brian D. Steavens, Tamura L. Goldberg, Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Rod Deluhery.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Lesser, Seth)
April 7, 2010 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #85 MOTION Deny Class Certification of California State Law Claim.. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Wymer, Martin)
April 7, 2010 Filing 85 MOTION Deny Class Certification of California State Law Claim. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation.(Wymer, Martin)
April 6, 2010 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (82 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 131 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH) MOTION Denial of Section 16(b) Certification. (CONTINUED). Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix First Compendium of Evidence (continued), #2 Exhibit 29 - Schwab Resume, #3 Exhibit 30 - Hernandez Resume, #4 Exhibit 31 - Declaration of Ernesto Alge, #5 Exhibit 32 - Declaration of Lisa Amthor, #6 Exhibit 33 - Declaration of Suzy Arnold, #7 Exhibit 34 - Declaration of Daryn Bartlett, #8 Exhibit 35 - Declaration of James Bintzler, #9 Exhibit 36 - Declaration of May-Wah Chu, #10 Exhibit 37 - Declaration of Patrick Claussen, #11 Exhibit 38 - Declaration of Michele Czaja, #12 Exhibit 39 - Declaration of Kenneth Davies, #13 Exhibit 40 - Declaration of Richard Digiovine, #14 Exhibit 41 - Declaration of Jerry Ferguson, #15 Exhibit 42 - Declaration of Michael Evans, #16 Exhibit 43 - Declaration of Gene Hensley, #17 Exhibit 44 - Declaration of John Hervey, #18 Exhibit 45 - Declaration of Tamara Kress, #19 Exhibit 46 - Declaration of Matthew Kukla, #20 Exhibit 47 - Declaration of Roy Lawson, #21 Exhibit 48 - Declaration of Keith McConnell, #22 Exhibit 49 - Declaration of Jerry McIlroy, #23 Exhibit 50 - Declaration of Pete Meendering, #24 Exhibit 51 - Declaration of James Miller, #25 Exhibit 52 - Declaration of Jennifer Miner, #26 Exhibit 53 - Declaration of Mike Shanks, #27 Exhibit 54 - Declaration of Loretta Sim, #28 Exhibit 55 - Declaration of Becky Simeon, #29 Exhibit 56 - Declaration of Dave Skotnicki, #30 Exhibit 57 - Declaration of William Stephenson, #31 Exhibit 58 - Declaration of Kenneth Vint, #32 Exhibit 59 - Declaration of Gary Wheeler, #33 Exhibit 60 - Declaration of Daniel Woo, #34 Exhibit 61 - Declaration of Richard Wood, #35 Exhibit 62 - Conklin Deposition Excerpts, #36 Exhibit 63 - Goldberg Deposition Excerpts, #37 Exhibit 64 - Pilon Deposition Excerpts, #38 Exhibit 65 - Eng-Hatcher v. Sprint Nextel Corp.)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Wymer, Martin)
April 6, 2010 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (131 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 82 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) MOTION Denial of Section 16(b) Certification.. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix First Compendium of Evidence, #2 Exhibit 1 - Ahlberg Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 - Barrix Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 3 - Brignola Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 4 - Brousseau Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 5 - Confar Deposition Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 6 - Deluhery Deposition Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 7 - Geary Deposition Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8 - Hernandez Deposition Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 9 - Merritt Deposition Excerpts, #11 Exhibit Schwab Deposition Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 11 - 3-Series Job Code Chart, #13 Exhibit 12 - Brousseau Job Survey Questionnaire, #14 Exhibit 13 - Brousseau Resume, #15 Exhibit 14 - Confar Release, #16 Exhibit 15 - Deluhery 2-18-09 email, #17 Exhibit 16 - Deluhery 11-13-08 email, #18 Exhibit 17 - Deluhery 1-9-09 email, #19 Exhibit 18 - Deluhery 11-18-08 email, #20 Exhibit 19 - Deluhery 8-4-04 email, #21 Exhibit Deluhery PRIDE Proposal, #22 Exhibit 21 - Deluhery PRIDE Proposal, #23 Exhibit 22 - Deluhery Project Recommendation, #24 Exhibit 13 - Deluhery Resume, #25 Exhibit 24 - Hernandez Performance Evaluation, #26 Exhibit 25 - Hernandez Job Survey Questionnaire, #27 Exhibit 26 - Deluhery Request for Admissions Responses, #28 Exhibit 27 - Brousseau Performance Evaluations, #29 Exhibit 28 - Schwab Release)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Wymer, Martin)
April 6, 2010 Filing 82 MOTION Denial of Section 16(b) Certification. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Wymer, Martin)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying (88) Motion to Strike ; denying (99) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:06-cv-03530-RJH; denying (40) Motion to Strike. For the reasons set forth in this Order, plaintiffs' motion to consolidate [99 in 06 Civ. 3530] and defendants' motions to strike [88 in 06 Civ. 3530; 40 in 08 Civ. 10409] are denied. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/30/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(tro)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF MICHAEL SNYDER: Pursuant to Rules 41(a)(1) and 23(e) of the F.R.C.P., Plaintiff withdraws without prejudice his class allegations and voluntarily dismisses with prejudice his individual state law claims. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/16/2010) (tro)
February 17, 2010 Filing 79 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on (91) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:06-cv-03530-RJH; AND (43) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:08-cv-10409-RJH. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of the Court is requested to close this motion. #91 , 06 Civ. 3530. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/16/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jpo)
February 17, 2010 Filing 78 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #31 PLANITIFFS' NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OPT-IN PLAINTIFF. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is requested to close this motion. #71 , 06 Civ 3530. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/16/2010) (jpo)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Martin T. Wymer dated 1/19/2010 re: Plaintiff and Defendant jointly submit this letter to request a 30-day extension of the dates set for fact discovery and the briefing schedule in the above-mentioned cases. The parties request that the Court approve the following new schedule: Scheduling conference: date and time to be set by the Court; Discovery deadline: 3/12/2010; Certification Motion: 4/7/2010; Response to Certification Motion: 5/7/2010; Reply to Certification Motion: 5/21/2010. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/29/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(tve)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OPT-IN PLAINTIFF. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of the Court is requested to close this motion. #38 , 08cv10409. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/15/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jfe)
December 21, 2009 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Maureen M. Crane in Support re: (72 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 121 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH) MOTION for Pitt,McGehee,Palmer,Rivers & Golden; Klafter Olsen & Lesser; Bromberg Law Office to Withdraw as Attorney.. Document filed by Brian D. Steavens. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
December 18, 2009 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion, Memo, Declaration served on Andrew Campbell on December 18, 2009. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Brian D. Steavens. (Crane, Maureen)
December 18, 2009 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (72 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 121 in 1:06-cv-03530-RJH) MOTION for Pitt,McGehee,Palmer,Rivers & Golden; Klafter Olsen & Lesser; Bromberg Law Office to Withdraw as Attorney. for Andrew Campbell. Document filed by Brian D. Steavens. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
December 18, 2009 Filing 72 MOTION for Pitt,McGehee,Palmer,Rivers & Golden; Klafter Olsen & Lesser; Bromberg Law Office to Withdraw as Attorney for Andrew Campbell. Document filed by Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Maureen M. Crane)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
November 20, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 2/10/2010. Motions due by 3/8/2010. Replies due by 4/21/2010. Responses due by 4/7/2010 Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. Status Conference set for 2/19/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (tro)
November 20, 2009 Filing 71 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Martin T. Wymer dated 11/18/09 re: The parties request that the Court approve the following new schedule: Initial Discovery deadline: 2/10/2010; Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification: 3/8/2010; EDS' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification: 4/7/2010; Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Conditional Certification: 4/21/2010. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. No further extensions. Status conference to be held on 2/19/10 at 11:00 a.m. Next PTC 2/19/2010 @ 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/18/09) (tro)
November 13, 2009 Filing 70 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-in Plaintiff. Document filed by Bartt L. Kuhlmann. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
November 13, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-in Plaintiff. Document filed by Adam Klier. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
October 21, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-in Plaintiff. Document filed by Stephen Lenker. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
October 21, 2009 Filing 67 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-in Plaintiff. Document filed by Steven Ashley-Lassen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
October 21, 2009 Filing 66 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-in Plaintiff. Document filed by Jamel Toombs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
October 21, 2009 Filing 65 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Opt-in Plaintiff. Document filed by Bryan Korth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
October 21, 2009 Filing 64 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Opt-in Plaintiff. Document filed by Brian Smith. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
October 15, 2009 Filing 63 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Opt-in Plaintiff. Document filed by Darrell Williams. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
October 15, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-in Plaintiff. Document filed by Michael Snyder. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Crane, Maureen)
October 8, 2009 Filing 61 MOTION to Withdraw Charles Mills' Consent to Join this Lawsuit. Document filed by Charles Mills.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
October 6, 2009 Filing 60 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by James J McCann.Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rivers, Beth)
October 1, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Holwell: Tele/Conference held on 10/1/2009. Discovery issues discussed: parties to meet and confer and submit revised schedule to the Court. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(tro)
September 30, 2009 Filing 59 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff Charles Myles. Document filed by Charles Myles. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Michelle B. Anselmo dated 9/1/09 re: Request for the modifications of the 3/5/09 Scheduling Order as further set forth in said letter: (i.e. Initial Discovery to 11/27/09; Expert Discovery to 12/11/09; EDS' response to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification to 1/19/10; Plaintiff's reply to 2/2/10. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Next PTC 11/20/09 @ 10:00am. (Expert Discovery due by 12/11/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell.), Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (Responses due by 1/19/2010, Replies due by 2/2/2010.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/18/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(db)
September 21, 2009 Filing 57 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION to Strike Document No. #32 Plaintiffs' Request for Rule 23 Class Certifications.. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unreported Case: Ramsey v. Ryan Beck & Co., Inc., #2 Exhibit Unreported Case: Toure, et al. v. Central Parking Systems of New York, et al., #3 Exhibit Unreported Case: Westerfield, et al. v. Washington Mutual Bank)(Wymer, Martin)
September 8, 2009 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Fran L. Rudich in Opposition re: #40 MOTION to Strike Document No. #32 Plaintiffs' Request for Rule 23 Class Certifications.. Document filed by Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Affidavit Certifcate of Service)(Bromberg, Brian)
September 8, 2009 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #40 MOTION to Strike Document No. #32 Plaintiffs' Request for Rule 23 Class Certifications.. Document filed by Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Bromberg, Brian)
September 2, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Lewis Bromberg on behalf of Brian D. Steavens (Bromberg, Brian)
August 28, 2009 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (50 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 50 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:06-cv-03530 and 1:08-cv-10409.. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 7-8-09 Letter from Defendant's Counsel to Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - 11-22-06 Order of Judge Lynch, #3 Exhibit Unreported Case: Chowdhury v. Duane Reade, Inc., #4 Exhibit Unreported Case: Watson v. Mayo, #5 Exhibit Unreported Case: Ocean Ships, Inc. v. Stiles, #6 Exhibit Unreported Case: Northern Assurance Co., et al. v. LaFarge North America)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Wymer, Martin)
August 14, 2009 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (50 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 50 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:06-cv-03530 and 1:08-cv-10409.. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
August 14, 2009 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Seth R. Lesser in Support re: (50 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH, 50 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:06-cv-03530 and 1:08-cv-10409.. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
August 14, 2009 Filing 50 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:06-cv-03530 and 1:08-cv-10409. Document filed by Kelley Cunningham(individually), Kelley Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Tammye Cunningham(individually), Tammye Cunningham(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Brian D. Steavens.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Klafter Olsen & Lesser LLP dated 7/29/2009 re: Requesting that Plaintiffs' opposition papers to be filed on August 27, 2009, Defendant's reply papers to be filed on September 14, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/3/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jpo)
July 21, 2009 Filing 48 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Seth R.Lesser dated 7/17/09 re: Counsel requests permission to bring his laptop to conference next Wednesday. ENDORSEMENT: Any Attorney on this matter may bring a laptop into the Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/21/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(djc)
July 17, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #47 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tro)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #34 Motion for Maureen Crane to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Maureen Crane is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Brian Steavens, et al., in this action. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/17/09) (tro)
July 16, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #46 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tro)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #33 Motion for Beth M. Rivers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Beth M. Rivers is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Brian Steavens, et al., in this action. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/16/09) (tro)
July 16, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #45 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tro)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #35 Motion for Cary S. McGehee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Cary S. McGehee is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Brian Steavens, et al., in this action. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/16/09) (tro)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: The parties are directed to appear for a conference on 7/22/2009 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. Out of town counsel may make arrangements with the Deputy Clerk, Mr. Donald, too appear by telephone. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/16/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(tro)
July 10, 2009 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw Danny Dale Harber's Consent to Join this Lawsuit. Document filed by Danny D Harber.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
July 6, 2009 Filing 42 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation. Related document: #32 Amended Complaint filed by Brian D. Steavens, Stephen Lenker, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Rod Deluhery, Daniel Hein, Tamura L. Goldberg.(Wymer, Martin)
July 6, 2009 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION to Strike Document No. #32 Plaintiffs' Request for Rule 23 Class Certifications.. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Steavens v. EDS Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Steavens v. EDS Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Steavens Order Transferring Case, #4 Exhibit 4 - Jameson v. EDS Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - George v. EDS Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - CA Industrial Welfare Commission Order 4-2001)(Wymer, Martin)
July 6, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION to Strike Document No. #32 Plaintiffs' Request for Rule 23 Class Certifications. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation. Responses due by 7/20/2009(Wymer, Martin)
July 1, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $75.00, paid on 06/16/2009, Receipt Number 691064. (jd)
June 30, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Electronic Data Systems Corporation answer due 7/6/2009. (jar)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Todd A. Dawson dated 6/24/2009 re: parties jointly request that the Court set a due date of 7/6/2009 for EDS to answer or plead in response to the Amended Complaint file in 06-cv-3530, and the Second Amended Complaint filed in 08-cv10409. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/29/2009) (jar)
June 29, 2009 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw Opt-In Plaintiff Chester Lucas Consent to join this lawsuit. Document filed by Chester Lucas.(Rudich, Fran)
June 29, 2009 Filing 37 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Milton Douglas Fugitt.(Rudich, Fran)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Todd A.Dawson dated 6/11/09 re: parties' joint request that the Court set a due date of June 29, 2009 for EDS to answe or otherwise plead in response to the Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Electronic Data Systems Corp. answer due 6/29/2009; Electronic Data Systems Corporation answer due 6/29/2009. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/16/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(djc)
June 16, 2009 Filing 35 MOTION for Cary S. McGehee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Tamura L. Goldberg, Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Rod Deluhery.(mbe)
June 16, 2009 Filing 34 MOTION for Maureen Crane to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Brian D. Steavens, Tamura L. Goldberg, Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Rod Deluhery.(mbe)
June 16, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION for Beth M. Rivers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Rod Deluhery.(mbe)
June 1, 2009 Filing 32 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Electronic Data Systems Corporation. Document filed by Brian D. Steavens, Tamura L. Goldberg, Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Rod Deluhery.(dle)
June 1, 2009 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw Julie Trombly's Consent to join this lawsuit. Document filed by Julie Trombly.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONFIDENTIAL ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/22/2009) (jpo)
May 22, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (29 in 1:08-cv-10409-RJH) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(dle)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADMITTING TODD A. DAWSON PRO HAC VICE: Todd A. Dawson is admitted pro hac vice to appear as counsel for defendant Electronic Data Systems, LLC in these matters in the same manner as an attorney admitted to this Court and it is further ordered that a copy of the within Order be sent to all counsel of record by the attorneys admitted pro hac vice within 10 days of the date hereof. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/22/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(dle)
May 15, 2009 Filing 28 MOTION for Todd A. Dawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(dle)
May 13, 2009 Filing 27 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Brian Smith.(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2009 Filing 26 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jennifer Hightower.(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2009 Filing 25 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Andrew Campbell.(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2009 Filing 24 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Paul Barrix.(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2009 Filing 23 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Darrell Williams.(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2009 Filing 22 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jamel Toombs.(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2009 Filing 21 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Lawrence E Pilon.(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2009 Filing 20 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by John P Confar.(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2009 Filing 19 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Ahmad Habbal.(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2009 Filing 18 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Mary G Ham.(Rudich, Fran)
May 13, 2009 Filing 17 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Robert Schwab.(Rudich, Fran)
May 11, 2009 Filing 16 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.6 re: that this action be filed as related to 1:09-cv-4005 (RJS). Document filed by Electronic Data Systmes Corp., Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Dismiss or Transfer In Favor of Prior Actions)Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Wymer, Martin)
April 13, 2009 Filing 15 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Michael Snyder.Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(Rudich, Fran)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO ENTER JOINT PROPOSED CONSOLIDATED CASE MANAGEMENT/DISCOVERY PLAN: Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2009. Joinder of Parties due by 4/30/2009. Motions due by 11/10/2009. Responses due by 12/8/2009 Replies due by 12/22/2009. Discovery due by 10/30/2009. Settlement Conference set for 11/6/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/2/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jmi) Modified on 3/23/2009 (jmi).
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES that the matters Kelley Cunningham, et at v. Electronic Data Systems Corp., Case No. 1:06-cv-03530-RJH and Brian D. Steavens, et al. v Electronic Data Systems Corporation, Case No.1:06-cv-10409-RJH are consolidated for pretrial purposes only. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/2/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-03530-RJH, 1:08-cv-10409-RJH(jmi)
March 5, 2009 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:06-cv-03530-RJH.. (jmi)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT that Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The briefing schedule for this motion will be as follows: Defendant will file its opening brief on May 6,2009; Plaintiffs will file their brief in opposition on or before June 5, 2009; and, Defendant will file its reply brief on or before June 19, 2009. ( Brief due by 5/6/2009, Responses due by 6/5/2009, Replies due by 6/19/2009.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/2/2009) (jmi)
February 25, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $75.00, paid on 01/15/2009, Receipt Number 674947. (jd)
February 19, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #11 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (mme)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADMITTING MICHELLE B. ANSELMO PRO HAC VICE granting #4 Motion for Michelle B. Anselmo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/18/09) (mme)
February 19, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (mme)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADMITTING GREGORY V. MERSOL PRO HAC VICE granting #5 Motion for Gregory V. Mersol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/18/09) (mme)
February 19, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (mme)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADMITTING MARTIN T. WYMER PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Martin T. Wymer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/18/09) (mme)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/13/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/9/09) (cd)
February 3, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tracy Lynn Cole on behalf of Electronic Data Systems Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cole, Tracy)
January 16, 2009 Filing 6 MOTION for Martin T. Wymer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation.(dle)
January 15, 2009 Filing 5 MOTION for Gregory V. Mersol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation.(dle)
January 15, 2009 Filing 4 MOTION for Michelle B. Anselmo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation.(dle)
December 29, 2008 Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (ad)
December 29, 2008 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:06-cv-03530-RJH. (ad)
December 29, 2008 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Holwell. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
December 15, 2008 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fran L. Rudich on behalf of Brian D. Steavens, Tamura L. Goldberg, Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Rod Deluhery (Rudich, Fran)
December 9, 2008 Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (laq)
December 9, 2008 Mailed letter to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Michigan acknowledging receipt of their entire file, a certified copy of the transfer order and docket entries. (laq)
December 2, 2008 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
December 2, 2008 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Richard J. Holwell as possibly related to 1:06-cv-3530. (laq)
December 2, 2008 Filing 1 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - Eastern District of Michigan; Case Number: 2:07-cv-14536 (LPZ). Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.Document filed by Brian D. Steavens, Tamura L. Goldberg, Daniel Hein, Bartt L. Kuhlmann, Stephen Lenker, Rod Deluhery.(laq) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2008: #1 doc 2, #2 doc 3, #3 doc 4, #4 doc 5, #5 doc 6, #6 doc 7, #7 doc 8, #8 doc 9, #9 doc 10, #10 doc 11, #11 doc 12, #12 doc 13, #13 doc 15, #14 doc 16, #15 doc 17, #16 doc 19, #17 doc 20, #18 doc 21, #19 doc 22, #20 doc 23, #21 doc 24, #22 doc 25, #23 doc 26, #24 doc 27, #25 doc 28, #26 doc 29, #27 doc 30, #28 doc 31, #29 doc 32, #30 doc 33, #31 doc 34) (laq).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steavens et al v. Electronic Data Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Lenker
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Beth R Rivers
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Maureen M. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hein
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Beth R Rivers
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Maureen M. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J McCann
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Beth R Rivers
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence E Pilon
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P Confar
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Habbal
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W.S. Acheson
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny D Harber
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Beth R Rivers
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie P. Sheridan
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Alan Slaith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamel Toombs
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary G Ham
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Williams
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Campbell
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Mills
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Smith
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamura L. Goldberg
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Beth R Rivers
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Maureen M. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Myles
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartt L. Kuhlmann
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Beth R Rivers
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Maureen M. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Barrix
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Klier
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Lucas
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Beth R Rivers
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Douglas Fugitt
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Beth R Rivers
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Korth
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Snyder
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod Deluhery
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Beth R Rivers
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Maureen M. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schwab
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ashley-Lassen
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hightower
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Trombly
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian D. Steavens
Represented By: Brian Lewis Bromberg
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Beth R Rivers
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Maureen M. Crane
Represented By: Kyra Naomi Hild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Data Systems Corporation
Represented By: Todd Aaron Dawson
Represented By: Martin T. Wymer
Represented By: Gary David Shapiro
Represented By: Paul Daniel Weiner
Represented By: Michelle B. Anselmo
Represented By: Stephanie Seay Kelly
Represented By: Lisa Ann Schreter
Represented By: Melodie K. Craft
Represented By: John A. Ybarra
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Joshua B. Waxman
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?