The San Mateo County Investment Pool v. Fuld
Plaintiff: The San Mateo County Investment Pool and Madeline Dimodica
Defendant: John F. Akers, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Erin Callan, Societe General Corporate & Investment Banking, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Joseph M. Gregory, Daiwa Capital Markets Europe Ltd., The Williams Capital Group, LLP, ING Financial Markets, Fortis Securities, BBVA Securities Inc., Erin M. Callan, David Goldfarb, Roger S. Berlind, Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Marsha Johnson Evans, Ernst & Young LLP, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Ian Lowitt, The Williams Capital Group LP, Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., M.R. Beal & Co., Banc of America Securities LLC, Richard S. Fuld, Jr., Henry Kaufman, Christopher M. O'Meara, Roland A. Hernandez, Mrs. Kathleen Fuld, Sun Trust Robinson Humphrey, Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc. and Natexis Bleichroeder Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01239
Filed: February 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, pursuant to Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, I, Steven B. Singer, former partner with the law firm Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, attorney for Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs and the Settlement Class in the above-entitled action, hereby withdraw as an attorney of record, as I am no longer associated with Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP. Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP will continue to serve as Counsel of record to Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs and the Settlement Class in the above-referenced matter. I hereby request that my name and email address be removed from the case's official docket. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. SO ORDERED., Attorney Steven B. Singer terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/17/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(ama)
April 29, 2016 Filing 303 SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 225, 273, 274, 286 and 296 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 04/29/2016.(mps)
March 22, 2016 Filing 302 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 225, 273, 274, 286 and 296 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 4/21/2016. (mps)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 301 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 99 (The New Jersey Action and the California Actions) terminating (1468) Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating (1469) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG. In Pretrial Order No. 98, the parties in the New Jersey action and the California actions were directed to show cause, in light of pending settlements in those cases, why orders should not be entered dismissing those actions subject to the right of the plaintiffs in those cases to reinstate the actions in the event that the putative settlements are not consummated. The plaintiffs in the California actions do not oppose this plan. Counsel for the State of New Jersey requests that the Court place the New Jersey action on the suspense docket until April 10, 2015, by which time the parties in that case anticipate filing a notice of dismissal. The Court nevertheless believes that sound management of the numerous dockets in this multidistrict litigation favors adopting its announced course of action. Consequently, the Court hereby dismisses the New Jersey action and the California actions with prejudice and without costs subject to the right of the plaintiff(s) in any of these actions to reinstate the action by filing, on or before April 20, 2015, a notice to that effect. Such notice may be filed in the event, and only in the event, that a settlement agreement has not been executed by that date in the case in which such a notice is filed. The Clerk shall close the New Jersey action (case no. 10-cv-5201) and the eight California actions (case nos. 09-cv-3474, 09-cv-3475, 09-cv-3476, 09-cv-6652, 09-cv-1944, 09-cv-1239, 09-cv-6040, and 09-cv-1238) and terminate all motions currently pending in those dockets. The Clerk shall terminate also the motions for summary judgment pending in the master docket, no. 09-md-2017, against New Jersey [DI 1469] and the California plaintiffs [DI 1468]. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/25/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al. (mro)
March 25, 2015 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (mro)
March 20, 2015 Filing 300 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Matthew K. Edling dated March 20, 2015 re: Response to March 13, 2015 Pretrial Order No. 98, Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Contra Costa Water District, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 98 (The New Jersey Action, the California Actions, and Motions in Related Cases): The Court is in receipt of two letters. The first [DI 1635], from counsel for the State of New Jersey, conveys that the plaintiff in that case and defendant Ernst & Young LLP ("EY") have reached an agreement in principle to settle their action. The second [DI 1636], from counsel for various entities identified collectively as the "California Plaintiffs," states that the plaintiffs in those cases and EY have reached an agreement in principle to settle their various actions. In both instances, counsel request that the Court suspend proceedings in their respective cases. Among the pending matters in these cases are EY's motions for summary judgment. But EY has moved also to exclude, or has opposed motions by certain plaintiffs to exclude, the testimony of various proposed experts. The resolution of the latter motions could affect both the New Jersey action and the California actions, and it would bear also on a number of other actions. In the circumstances, the parties in the New Jersey action and the California actions shall show cause, on or before March 20, 2015, why orders should not be entered in each of those actions dismissing each action with prejudice and without costs subject to the right of either party thereto to reinstate the action by filing, on or before April 20, 2015, a notice to that effect. Such notice may be filed in the event, and only in the event, that a settlement agreement has not been executed by that date in the case in which such a notice is filed. While the Court has other matters and responsibilities demanding attention that may prevent resolution before April 20, 2015 of the motions with respect to proposed experts, the Court sees insufficient reason, given their possible importance in other cases, to delay their resolution for the reason suggested by counsel in the two letters. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
March 12, 2015 Filing 298 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Matthew K. Edling dated 03/12/2015 re: request to suspend ongoing proceedings with respect to the California Plaintiffs and Defendant Ernst & Young LLP while finalizing terms of settlement. Document filed by Contra Costa Water District, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
March 4, 2015 Filing 297 DECLARATION of Matthew K. Edling in Opposition re: (194 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 174 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 161 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 1471 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 52 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 163 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 269 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 190 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1472 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Contra Costa Water District, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co., Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, The San Mateo County Investment Pool. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
March 4, 2015 Filing 296 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 3, 2015 Filing 295 DECLARATION of Kevin M. McDonough in Support re: (194 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 1471 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 269 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 174 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 161 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 52 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 163 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 190 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun ., (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A and Exhibits 1-4)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McDonough, Kevin)
December 19, 2014 Filing 294 DECLARATION of Matthew K. Edling in Support re: (225 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 1539 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 88 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 252 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 230 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 225 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 303 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 251 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 210 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen G. Ryan ., (230 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 305 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 90 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 1541 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 212 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 254 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 253 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of William J. Chambers ., (191 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 245 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 189 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 246 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 1533 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 219 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 297 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 82 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 204 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor John J. Lynch ., (229 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 229 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 92 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 256 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 255 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 1543 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 199 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 214 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 234 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 201 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 307 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen Choi ., (249 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 250 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 223 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 1537 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 226 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 223 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 301 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 208 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 86 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Zoe-Vonna Palmrose ., (191 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 247 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 1535 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 220 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 299 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 84 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 206 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 248 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Glenn A. Okun ., (79 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 215 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 186 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 188 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 294 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 1530 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 242 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 201 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 243 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Allen Ferrell .. Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
December 19, 2014 Filing 293 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (249 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 250 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 223 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 1537 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 223 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 301 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 208 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 86 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Zoe-Vonna Palmrose . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
December 19, 2014 Filing 292 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (230 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 1541 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 212 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 305 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 254 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 253 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 90 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of William J. Chambers . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
December 19, 2014 Filing 291 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (229 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 229 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 92 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 256 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 214 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 234 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 201 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 307 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 255 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 1543 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 228 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen Choi . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
December 19, 2014 Filing 290 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (294 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 1530 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 79 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 215 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 242 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 201 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 186 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 243 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 188 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Allen Ferrell . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
December 19, 2014 Filing 289 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (191 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 245 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 297 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 189 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 246 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 82 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 204 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 1533 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor John J. Lynch . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
December 19, 2014 Filing 288 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (225 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 230 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 1539 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 224 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 88 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 225 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 303 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 252 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 251 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 210 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen G. Ryan . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
December 19, 2014 Filing 287 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (191 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 299 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 247 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 84 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 1535 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 206 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 220 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 248 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Glenn A. Okun . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
November 24, 2014 Filing 286 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
November 21, 2014 Filing 285 DECLARATION of Allen Ferrell in Opposition re: (294 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 1530 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 79 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 215 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 242 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 201 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 186 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 188 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Allen Ferrell .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
November 21, 2014 Filing 284 DECLARATION of William Furnish in Opposition re: (230 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 305 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 253 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 90 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 1541 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 212 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of William J. Chambers ., (191 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 245 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 189 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 297 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 82 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 204 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 1533 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 222 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor John J. Lynch ., (229 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 1543 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 234 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 307 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 229 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 92 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 255 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 214 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 201 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen Choi ., (223 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 1537 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 226 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 249 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 223 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 301 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 208 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 86 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Zoe-Vonna Palmrose ., (247 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 220 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 206 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 1535 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 193 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 299 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 84 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Glenn A. Okun ., (79 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 215 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 188 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 294 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 1530 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 186 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 242 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 201 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Allen Ferrell ., (230 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 225 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 1539 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 88 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 225 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 303 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 251 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 210 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen G. Ryan .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6-14, #4 Exhibit 15-25, #5 Exhibit 26-30, #6 Exhibit 31-32, #7 Exhibit 33, #8 Exhibit 34 (Part 1), #9 Exhibit 34 (Part 2), #10 Exhibit 34 (Part 3), #11 Exhibit 34 (Part 4), #12 Exhibit 35-38, #13 Exhibit 39 (Part 1), #14 Exhibit 39 (Part 2), #15 Exhibit 39 (Part 3), #16 Exhibit 40-45, #17 Exhibit 46, #18 Exhibit 47, #19 Exhibit 48-52, #20 Exhibit 53-57, #21 Exhibit 58-63, #22 Exhibit 64 (Part 1), #23 Exhibit 64 (Part 2), #24 Exhibit 65-71, #25 Exhibit 72, #26 Exhibit 73 (Part 1), #27 Exhibit 73 (Part 2), #28 Exhibit 74-76, #29 Exhibit 77-78, #30 Exhibit 79-80, #31 Exhibit 81-84, #32 Exhibit 85-86 (Part 1), #33 Exhibit 86 (Part 2), #34 Exhibit 86 (Part 3))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Furnish, William)
November 21, 2014 Filing 283 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (294 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 1530 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 79 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 215 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 242 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 201 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 186 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 188 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Allen Ferrell . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
November 21, 2014 Filing 282 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (225 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 230 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 1539 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 224 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 88 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 225 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 303 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 251 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 210 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen G. Ryan . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
November 21, 2014 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (191 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 245 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 297 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 189 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 82 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 204 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 1533 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor John J. Lynch . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
November 21, 2014 Filing 280 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (229 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 229 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 92 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 214 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 234 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 201 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 307 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 255 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 1543 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 228 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen Choi . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
November 21, 2014 Filing 279 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (230 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 1541 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 212 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 305 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 253 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 90 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of William J. Chambers . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
November 21, 2014 Filing 278 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (191 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 299 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 247 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 84 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 1535 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 206 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 220 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Glenn A. Okun . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
November 21, 2014 Filing 277 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (249 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 223 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 1537 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 223 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 301 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 208 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 86 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Zoe-Vonna Palmrose . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Miles N. Ruthberg dated 11/17/14 re: Counsel respectfully requests that the Court endorse this letter to permit the filing of Confidential Discovery Material and unredacted versions of EY's Oppositions (and related documents) under seal, as necessary to comply with the Protective Order. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/19/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
October 30, 2014 Filing 275 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Matthew K. Edling dated 10/28/14 re: Counsel requests that Ernst & Young LLP be given five weeks to oppose plaintiff's motion (November 21, 2014) and Plaintiffs four weeks thereafter to reply (December 19, 2014). Given that the motions will not be fulled briefed until December 19, 2014, consistent with your Honor's local rules, Plaintiffs are available for oral argument January 12, 2015 forward with the exception of February 2, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed briefing schedule is approved. The matter of oral argument will be addressed separately. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/30/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) Modified on 11/3/2014 (mro).
October 30, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/21/2014 Replies due by 12/19/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
October 21, 2014 Filing 274 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
October 21, 2014 Filing 273 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
October 20, 2014 Filing 272 COUNTER STATEMENT TO (179 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 196 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 57 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 1482 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 199 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 168 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 274 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 223 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 196 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 202 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 166 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Part 1, #2 Appendix - Part 2, #3 Appendix - Part 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McDonough, Kevin)
October 20, 2014 Filing 271 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
October 20, 2014 Filing 270 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Kevin M. McDonough -- Supplemental Declaration of Kevin M. McDonough in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 261-289, #2 Exhibits 290-296, #3 Exhibits 297-307)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McDonough, Kevin)
October 20, 2014 Filing 269 DECLARATION of John Lynch, CPA in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McDonough, Kevin)
October 20, 2014 Filing 268 DECLARATION of Professor Allen Ferrell in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McDonough, Kevin)
October 20, 2014 Filing 267 DECLARATION of Professor Glenn Okun in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McDonough, Kevin)
October 20, 2014 Filing 266 DECLARATION of Professor Kenneth Lehn in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McDonough, Kevin)
October 20, 2014 Filing 265 DECLARATION of Professor Stephen Ryan, Ph.D. in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McDonough, Kevin)
October 20, 2014 Filing 264 REPLY re: (1481 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) Notice (Other),,,,, -- Reply in Support of Defendant Ernst & Young LLP's Request for Judicial Notice. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
October 20, 2014 Filing 263 DECLARATION of Professor Zoe-Vonna Palmrose in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
October 20, 2014 Filing 262 DECLARATION of Stephen Choi in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
October 20, 2014 Filing 261 DECLARATION of William J. Chambers, Ph.D. in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
October 20, 2014 Filing 260 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Christopher S. Turner -- Supplemental Declaration of Christopher S. Turner in Support of Defendant Ernst & Young LLP's Reply Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun in Support re: (194 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 1471 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 269 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 174 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 161 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 52 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 163 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 190 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Q-U, #2 Exhibits V-W)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
October 20, 2014 Filing 259 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (194 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 174 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 161 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 1471 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 52 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 163 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 269 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 190 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Ashley J. Brick dated 10/17/14 re: Plaintiffs request that the Court endorse this letter to permit the filing of Confidential Discovery Material and unredacted versions of Plaintiffs' Motions (and related documents) under seal, as necessary to comply with the Protective Order. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/20/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
October 17, 2014 Filing 257 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (229 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 229 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 92 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 256 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 214 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 234 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 201 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 307 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 255 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 1543 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 228 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen Choi . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 256 DECLARATION of Matthew K. Edling in Support re: (230 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 305 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 254 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 253 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 90 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 1541 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 212 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of William J. Chambers ., (191 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 245 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 189 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 246 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 297 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 82 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 204 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 1533 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 222 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor John J. Lynch ., (229 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 1543 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 234 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 307 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 229 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 92 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 256 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 255 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 214 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 201 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen Choi ., (223 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 1537 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 226 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 249 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 250 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 223 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 301 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 208 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 86 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Zoe-Vonna Palmrose ., (247 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 220 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 206 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 248 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 1535 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 193 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 299 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 84 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Glenn A. Okun ., (79 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 215 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 188 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 294 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 1530 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 243 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 186 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 242 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 201 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Allen Ferrell ., (230 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 225 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 1539 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 88 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 252 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 225 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 303 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 251 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 210 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen G. Ryan .. Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 255 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen Choi . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 254 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (230 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 1541 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 212 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 305 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 254 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 199 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 227 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 253 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 90 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 232 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of William J. Chambers . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 253 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of William J. Chambers . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 252 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (225 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 230 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 1539 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 224 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 88 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 225 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 303 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 252 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 251 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 210 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen G. Ryan . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 251 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen G. Ryan . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 250 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (249 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 250 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 223 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 228 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 1537 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 223 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 301 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 208 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 86 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Zoe-Vonna Palmrose . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 249 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Zoe-Vonna Palmrose . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 248 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (191 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 299 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 247 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 84 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 226 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 1535 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 206 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 220 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 248 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Glenn A. Okun . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 247 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor Glenn A. Okun . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 246 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (191 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 245 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 297 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 189 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 246 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 224 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 82 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 204 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 1533 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor John J. Lynch . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 245 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Professor John J. Lynch . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (294 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 1530 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 79 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 215 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 242 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 201 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 186 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 243 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 188 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Allen Ferrell . . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 243 DECLARATION of H. Nejat Seyhun in Support re: (294 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 1530 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 79 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 215 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 242 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 201 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 186 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 243 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 219 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 216 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 221 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 188 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Allen Ferrell .. Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 17, 2014 Filing 242 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Allen Ferrell . Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Miles N. Ruthberg dated 10/8/2014 re: 60-Page limit for reply to Plaintiffs' omnibus opposition. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/9/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(ajs)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL APPEARANCE: ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/8/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro)
October 6, 2014 Filing 239 DECLARATION of Matthew K. Edling in Opposition re: (1473 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 212 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (161 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 269 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 52 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 163 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 194 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 190 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 174 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 1471 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 191 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun ., (1472 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14 - Part 1, #15 Exhibit 14 - Part 2, #16 Exhibit 14 - Part 3, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36 - Part 1, #39 Exhibit 36 - Part 2, #40 Exhibit 36 - Part 3, #41 Exhibit 36 - Part 4, #42 Exhibit 37, #43 Exhibit 38, #44 Exhibit 39, #45 Exhibit 40, #46 Exhibit 41, #47 Exhibit 42, #48 Exhibit 43, #49 Exhibit 44, #50 Exhibit 45, #51 Exhibit 46, #52 Exhibit 47, #53 Exhibit 48, #54 Exhibit 49, #55 Exhibit 50, #56 Exhibit 51, #57 Exhibit 52, #58 Exhibit 53, #59 Exhibit 54, #60 Exhibit 55, #61 Exhibit 56, #62 Exhibit 57, #63 Exhibit 58, #64 Exhibit 59, #65 Exhibit 60 - Part 1, #66 Exhibit 60 - Part 2, #67 Exhibit 60 - Part 3, #68 Exhibit 60 - Part 4, #69 Exhibit 60 - Part 5, #70 Exhibit 60 - Part 6, #71 Exhibit 60 - Part 7, #72 Exhibit 60 - Part 8, #73 Exhibit 61, #74 Exhibit 62, #75 Exhibit 63, #76 Exhibit 64, #77 Exhibit 65, #78 Exhibit 66, #79 Exhibit 67, #80 Exhibit 68, #81 Exhibit 69, #82 Exhibit 70, #83 Exhibit 71, #84 Exhibit 72, #85 Exhibit 73, #86 Exhibit 74, #87 Exhibit 75, #88 Exhibit 76, #89 Exhibit 77, #90 Exhibit 78, #91 Exhibit 79, #92 Exhibit 80, #93 Exhibit 81, #94 Exhibit 82, #95 Exhibit 83, #96 Exhibit 84, #97 Exhibit 85, #98 Exhibit 86, #99 Exhibit 87, #100 Exhibit 88, #101 Exhibit 89, #102 Exhibit 90, #103 Exhibit 91, #104 Exhibit 92, #105 Exhibit 93, #106 Exhibit 94, #107 Exhibit 95 - Part 1, #108 Exhibit 95 - Part 2, #109 Exhibit 95 - Part 3, #110 Exhibit 96, #111 Exhibit 97, #112 Exhibit 98, #113 Exhibit 99, #114 Exhibit 100, #115 Exhibit 101, #116 Exhibit 102, #117 Exhibit 103, #118 Exhibit 104, #119 Exhibit 105, #120 Exhibit 106, #121 Exhibit 107, #122 Exhibit 108, #123 Exhibit 109, #124 Exhibit 110, #125 Exhibit 111, #126 Exhibit 112, #127 Exhibit 113, #128 Exhibit 114, #129 Exhibit 115, #130 Exhibit 116, #131 Exhibit 117, #132 Exhibit 118, #133 Exhibit 119, #134 Exhibit 120, #135 Exhibit 121, #136 Exhibit 122, #137 Exhibit 123, #138 Exhibit 124, #139 Exhibit 125, #140 Exhibit 126, #141 Exhibit 127, #142 Exhibit 128, #143 Exhibit 129, #144 Exhibit 130, #145 Exhibit 131, #146 Exhibit 132, #147 Exhibit 133, #148 Exhibit 134, #149 Exhibit 135, #150 Exhibit 136, #151 Exhibit 137, #152 Exhibit 138, #153 Exhibit 139, #154 Exhibit 140, #155 Exhibit 141, #156 Exhibit 142, #157 Exhibit 143, #158 Exhibit 144, #159 Exhibit 145, #160 Exhibit 146, #161 Exhibit 147, #162 Exhibit 148 - Part 1, #163 Exhibit 148 - Part 2, #164 Exhibit 148 - Part 3, #165 Exhibit 149, #166 Exhibit 150, #167 Exhibit 151, #168 Exhibit 152 - Part 1, #169 Exhibit 152 - Part 2, #170 Exhibit 153, #171 Exhibit 154, #172 Exhibit 155, #173 Exhibit 156, #174 Exhibit 157, #175 Exhibit 158, #176 Exhibit 159, #177 Exhibit 160, #178 Exhibit 161, #179 Exhibit 162, #180 Exhibit 163, #181 Exhibit 164, #182 Exhibit 165, #183 Exhibit 166, #184 Exhibit 167, #185 Exhibit 168, #186 Exhibit 169, #187 Exhibit 170, #188 Exhibit 171, #189 Exhibit 172, #190 Exhibit 173, #191 Exhibit 174, #192 Exhibit 175, #193 Exhibit 176, #194 Exhibit 177, #195 Exhibit 178, #196 Exhibit 179, #197 Exhibit 180, #198 Exhibit 181, #199 Exhibit 182, #200 Exhibit 183, #201 Exhibit 184, #202 Exhibit 185, #203 Exhibit 186, #204 Exhibit 187, #205 Exhibit 188, #206 Exhibit 189, #207 Exhibit 190, #208 Exhibit 191, #209 Exhibit 192, #210 Exhibit 193, #211 Exhibit 194, #212 Exhibit 195, #213 Exhibit 196, #214 Exhibit 197, #215 Exhibit 198, #216 Exhibit 199, #217 Exhibit 200, #218 Exhibit 201, #219 Exhibit 202, #220 Exhibit 203, #221 Exhibit 204, #222 Exhibit 205, #223 Exhibit 206, #224 Exhibit 207, #225 Exhibit 208, #226 Exhibit 209, #227 Exhibit 210, #228 Exhibit 211, #229 Exhibit 212, #230 Exhibit 213, #231 Exhibit 214, #232 Exhibit 215 - Part 1, #233 Exhibit 215 - Part 2, #234 Exhibit 215 - Part 3, #235 Exhibit 216, #236 Exhibit 217, #237 Exhibit 218, #238 Exhibit 219, #239 Exhibit 220, #240 Exhibit 221, #241 Exhibit 222, #242 Exhibit 223, #243 Exhibit 224, #244 Exhibit 225, #245 Exhibit 226, #246 Exhibit 227, #247 Exhibit 228, #248 Exhibit 229, #249 Exhibit 230, #250 Exhibit 231, #251 Exhibit 232, #252 Exhibit 233, #253 Exhibit 234, #254 Exhibit 235, #255 Exhibit 236, #256 Exhibit 237, #257 Exhibit 238 - Part 1, #258 Exhibit 238 - Part 2, #259 Exhibit 239, #260 Exhibit 240, #261 Exhibit 241, #262 Exhibit 242, #263 Exhibit 243, #264 Exhibit 244, #265 Exhibit 245, #266 Exhibit 246, #267 Exhibit 247, #268 Exhibit 248, #269 Exhibit 249, #270 Exhibit 250, #271 Exhibit 251, #272 Exhibit 252, #273 Exhibit 253, #274 Exhibit 254, #275 Exhibit 255, #276 Exhibit 256, #277 Exhibit 257, #278 Exhibit 258, #279 Exhibit 259, #280 Exhibit 260, #281 Exhibit 261, #282 Exhibit 262)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 6, 2014 Filing 238 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 6, 2014 Filing 237 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (194 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 174 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 161 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 1471 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 52 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 163 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 269 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 190 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun ., (1473 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 212 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun . Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Ernst & Young LLP's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun. Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
October 6, 2014 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1472 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment . [Redacted] Certain Op-Out Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Ernst & Young LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by American National Insurance Company, C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Foundation Property Management, Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The Moody Foundation, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
September 30, 2014 Filing 235 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John J. Calandra dated 9/22/14 re: Counsel writes on behalf of the plaintiffs and encloses the papers listed herein. Document filed by Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, et al. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Miles N. Ruthberg dated 9/24/14 re: Counsel requests that the plaintiffs be required to redact their own summary judgment papers, in accordance with the Protective Order, and file them in redacted form on the Court's docket by a reasonable date to be set by the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs are so directed. This shall occur by Oct. 14, 2014. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/30/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
September 30, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 97 (Ernst & Young Summary Judgment and Related Motions): Defendant Ernst & Young LLP has moved for summary judgment dismissing the complaints in the thirteen above-captioned actions as well as to exclude certain expert testimony in many of them. Oppositions to all or most of the summary judgment motions as well as to at least some of the motions to exclude have been filed. The motions, affidavits and declarations, exhibits and memoranda of law are voluminous. The time for filing of reply papers has not yet expired. It would be extremely helpful to the Court if the parties, after conferring with a view to accomplishing the objective in the most efficient and inexpensive form, would submit two sets of text-searchable PDF documents of all of the materials in support of and in opposition to these motions in electronic form (preferably flash drives or DVDs), suitably indexed and hyperlinked to facilitate easy reference from one "document" to another. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
September 22, 2014 Filing 232 DECLARATION of Gary L. Holstrum in Opposition re: (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1472 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Contra Costa Water District, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
September 22, 2014 Filing 231 DECLARATION of R. Larry Johnson in Opposition re: (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1472 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
September 22, 2014 Filing 230 DECLARATION of D. Paul Regan, CPA in Opposition re: (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1472 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by American National Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
September 19, 2014 Filing 229 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: (273 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 1481 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 201 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 194 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 178 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 222 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 165 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 195 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 56 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 167 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 198 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) Notice (Other),,,,, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Ernst & Young's Request for Judicial Notice. Document filed by Contra Costa Water District, American National Insurance Company, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Retirement Housing Foundation, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Starr International U.S.A. Investments LC, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co., C.V. Starr & Co., Inc. Trust, The San Mateo County Investment Pool, American National Insurance Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Matthew K. Edling dated 9/16/2014 re: Plaintiffs respectfully request that the Court endorse this letter to permit the filing of Confidential Discovery Material and unredacted versions of Plaintiffs' Oppositions and Rule 56.1 statements of undisputed material facts (and related documents) under seal as necessary to comply with the Protective Order. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Matthew K. Edling dated 9/8/2014 re: Counsel writes for two reasons: (1) to propose an omnibus briefing structure for plaintiffs' summary judgment opposition briefs; and (2) to seek clarification from the Court on motions to exclude. Plaintiffs propose that one omnibus opposition brief be filed in response to EY's five briefs. Plaintiffs propose that this omnibus brief be no more than one hundred and twenty-five pages which would allow for Plaintiffs to respond to both the areas of EY's briefs that are common to all plaintiffs, as well as those that are unique to individual plaintiffs (including but not limited to state law claims). Plaintiffs further propose submitting one omnibus Response to EY's Statement Material Facts regarding the California Plaintiffs, American National Insurance Company, the State of New Jersey, and Starr International, and a separate Response to EY's Statement of Material Facts regarding Retirement Housing Foundation. EY maintains that any motions to exclude under Daubert v. Merrill Dow, 509 U.S. 113 S. Ct. 2786, 125 L. Ed. 2d 469 and/or Fed. R. Evid. 702 must be brought by the parties in conjunction with the parties summary judgment briefing regardless of whether that expert's opinion is relied upon in moving or opposing summary judgment. Because the parties disagree on this point, Plaintiffs request the Court's assistance. Should the Court agree with EY, Plaintiffs respectfully request they have until October 17, 2014 to file any additional motions to exclude any expert testimony at trial. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Granted. An motion to exclude expert testimony relied upon in the summary judgment motions must be made by 10/17/14. Plaintiffs' papers in opposition to E+Y's summary judgment motions shall be filed on or before 10/17/14 unless a different date was established by prior order, in which case the previously established date will govern. ( Motions due by 10/17/2014., Responses due by 10/17/2014) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/11/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
August 19, 2014 Filing 226 JOINT STIPULATION FOR CLARIFICATION OF PRETRIAL MOTION SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO PTO 61: NOW, THEREFORE, the parties jointly stipulate to the following: 1. Any oppositions to EY's motions to exclude testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun shall be filed on or before September 19, 2014. Any reply briefs shall be filed on or before October 20, 2014. 2. Any motions to exclude testimony of EY's expert witnesses shall be filed on or before September 19, 2014. Any opposition briefs shall be filed on or before October 31, 2014. Any reply briefs shall be filed on or before December 1, 2014. ( Motions due by 9/19/2014., Responses due by 10/31/2014, Replies due by 12/1/2014.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams Part 1 Judge on 8/19/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(js) Modified on 8/21/2014 (js).
August 19, 2014 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (1495) Joint Stipulation for clarification. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(js)
August 19, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (1471 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 197 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 194 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 269 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 190 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 163 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 161 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 174 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 52 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun ., (1473 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 212 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun . Responses due by 9/19/2014 Replies due by 10/20/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(js)
August 11, 2014 Filing 225 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
August 8, 2014 Filing 224 DECLARATION of Kevin M. McDonough in Support re: (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit --Exhibits 1-2, #2 Exhibit --Exhibits 3-4 (Part 1-2), #3 Exhibit --Exhibit 4 (Part 3-4), #4 Exhibit --Exhibits 4 (Part 5-6), #5 Exhibit --Exhibits 5-10, #6 Exhibit --Exhibit 11 (Part 1), #7 Exhibit --Exhibit 11 (Part 2), #8 Exhibit --Exhibits 12-25, #9 Exhibit --Exhibits 26-32, #10 Exhibit --Exhibits 33-45, #11 Exhibit --Exhibits 46-50, #12 Exhibit --Exhibits 51-52, #13 Exhibit --Exhibits 53-55, #14 Exhibit --Exhibits 56-57, #15 Exhibit --Exhibits 58-62, #16 Exhibit --Exhibits 63-76, #17 Exhibit --Exhibits 77-93, #18 Exhibit --Exhibits 94-97, #19 Exhibit --Exhibit 98 (Part 1), #20 Exhibit --Exhibit 98 (Part 2), #21 Exhibit --Exhibit 99 (Part 1), #22 Exhibit --Exhibit 99 (Part 2), #23 Exhibit --Exhibits 100-101, #24 Exhibit --Exhibit 102 (Part 1), #25 Exhibit --Exhibit 102 (Part 2), #26 Exhibit --Exhibits 103-104, #27 Exhibit --Exhibits 105-107, #28 Exhibit --Exhibits 108-119, #29 Exhibit --Exhibits 120-130, #30 Exhibit --Exhibits 131-138, #31 Exhibit --Exhibits 139-142, #32 Exhibit --Exhibits 143-159, #33 Exhibit --Exhibits 160-185, #34 Exhibit --Exhibits 186-199, #35 Exhibit --Exhibits 200-207, #36 Exhibit --Exhibits 208-222, #37 Exhibit --Exhibits 223-232, #38 Exhibit --Exhibits 233-234, #39 Exhibit --Exhibits 235-250, #40 Exhibit --Exhibits 251-256, #41 Exhibit --Exhibits 257-260)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
August 8, 2014 Filing 223 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
August 8, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE of -- Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Ernst & Young LLP's Motions for Summary Judgment re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (51 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1467 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1470 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (173 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (268 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1466 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (65 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1469 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
August 8, 2014 Filing 221 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (193 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (217 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (160 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (196 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (1468 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (189 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (190 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment ., (162 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
August 8, 2014 Filing 220 DECLARATION of Christopher S. Turner in Support re: (194 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 1471 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 269 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 174 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 161 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 52 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 163 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 190 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun .. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
August 8, 2014 Filing 219 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (194 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 174 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 218 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 161 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 1471 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 52 in 1:11-cv-03745-LAK, 163 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 269 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 197 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 191 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 190 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun . . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
August 8, 2014 Filing 218 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. H. Nejat Seyhun . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
August 8, 2014 Filing 217 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP.(Ruthberg, Miles)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Miles N. Ruthberg dated 8/1/2014 re: EY respectfully requests that the Court endorse this letter to permit the filing of Confidential Discovery Material and unredacted versions of EY's briefs and statements of undisputed material facts (and related documents) under seal, as necessary to comply with the Protective Order. ENDORSEMENT: The application to permit Ernst & Young to file Confidential Discovery Material and unredacted briefs and certain other documents under seal as required by the protective order is GRANTED, provided however that the Court makes no finding of good cause with respect to these materials. In the event the sealing of any of these materials is challenged, Ernst & Young will bear the burden of establishing good cause. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/5/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(cd)
July 9, 2014 Filing 215 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL MOTION SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO PTO 61: Expert Discovery due by 6/27/2014. Motions for summary judgment due by 8/8/2014. Responses due by 9/19/2014. Replies due by 10/20/2014. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/9/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(cd)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 89 (Individual Actions - May 22, 2014 Order): Counsel for various parties to some of these actions last month submitted a Joint Stipulation for Extension of Expert Discovery and Pretrial Motion Schedule Pursuant to PTO 61 which the Court approved. Unfortunately, the Court failed to notice that the caption failed to comply with paragraph 2.2 of PTO No. 1 in that the caption stated that the document applied to "All Individual Actions" rather than stating "the docket number of each individual case to which it [the Joint Stipulation] pertains." In consequence, the Joint Stipulation is not clear as to the specific actions to which it pertains. Even more significant, the failure to state the docket number of each individual case to which it pertains resulted in the lack of docket entries reflecting the Joint Stipulation in the dockets of the individual cases to which it pertains. The Joint Stipulation [09 MD 2017 - DI 1412] is vacated. Counsel within 10 days may file a new joint stipulation that complies with paragraph 2.2 of PTO No. 1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/25/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(ja)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL MOTION SCHEDULE PURSUANT TO PTO 61: Expert Discovery due by 6/27/2014 in the Individual Actions. Motions for summary judgment in the Individual Actions due by 8/8/2014. Responses due by 9/19/2014, Replies due by 10/20/2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/22/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(ajs)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(2), the parties hereby stipulate to dismiss Defendant Joseph M. Gregory from the above titled actions with prejudice and each party is to bear its own costs. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/19/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(cd)
February 14, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Matthew Edling Document (156 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(dt)
February 13, 2014 Filing 211 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Joseph M. Gregory pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by San Mateo County Investment Pool, Contra Costa Water District, Mary A. Zeeb, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, Zenith Insurance Co., City of San Buenaventura, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew) Modified on 2/14/2014 (dt).
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUED SUSPENSION OF ACTIONS: All parties to the Individual Actions jointly stipulate to the following: 1. All ongoing proceedings in the referenced actions shall be suspended until March 20, 2014. 2. Expert discovery and pretrial motions shall commence as set forth in PTO 61 with the following amendments: Paragraph 6 shall be amended to state that "Expert discovery shall be completed in the Individual Actions on or before May 16, 2014." Paragraph 7 shall be amended to state: "Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed in the Individual Actions on or before June 13, 2014; any opposition to a motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before July 11, 2014; and any reply brief in support of a motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before August 8, 2014." The first sentence of Paragraph 8 shall be amended to state: "The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order for the Individual Actions shall be submitted on or before September 17, 2014." 3. The parties to this Stipulation reserve all rights available to them., ( Expert Discovery due by 5/16/2014., Motions due by 6/13/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/17/2014., Responses due by 7/11/2014., Replies due by 8/8/2014.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/22/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(lmb)
January 10, 2014 Filing 209 STIPULATION OF PARTIAL VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Now therefore, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), the parties hereby stipulate to dismiss the Individual Defendants (except for defendant Joseph M. Gregory) from the above titled actions with prejudice. No other parties to this action (including Defendant Ernst & Young LLP and Joseph M. Gregory) are being dismissed by this stipulation, and each party is to bear its own costs. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/10/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(lmb)
January 9, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Matthew Edling Document #207 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval. (jno)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 BAR AND JUDGMENT REDUCTION ORDER granting (1336) Motion for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG; granting (183) Motion for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-01238-LAK; granting (204) Motion for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-01239-LAK; granting (180) Motion for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-01944-LAK; granting (177) Motion for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-03474-LAK; granting (177) Motion for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-03475-LAK; granting (176) Motion for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-03476-LAK; granting (147) Motion for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-06652-LAK; granting (149) Motion for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-06040-LAK. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Gregory and the other Releasees are discharged from all claims for contribution and all claims for indemnification, however styled, by any person or entity, whether arising under state, federal or common law, based upon, arising from, relating to, or in connection with the Plaintiffs' Released Claims released in the Settlement Agreement (together, "Contribution Claims"). Accordingly, to the fullest extent provided by law, the Court bars, enjoins, and restrains any and all Contribution Claims (a) against Gregory and the other Releasees, or (b) against Ernst & Young by Gregory and the other Releasees, their insurers, subrogees, or assigns, or anyone acting on behalf of Gregory, the other Releasees, their insurers, subrogees, or assigns. 2. In the event Plaintiffs, or any of them, seek to recover damages or any other form of monetary relief ("Damages") from any person or entity based upon, arising from, relating to, or in connection with the Plaintiffs' Released Claims released in the Settlement Agreement, any verdict or judgment in such action in favor of Plaintiffs, or any of them, shall be reduced by the greater of: (a) the amount of recovery obtained by the Plaintiff(s) in connection with the Settlement Agreement; or (b) the amount of any and all of Gregory's percentage share of responsibility for the Damages. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/8/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al. (lmb)
January 8, 2014 Filing 207 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Erin M. Callan, Marsha Johnson Evans, Kathleen Fuld, Richard S. Fuld, Jr, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Ian Lowitt, Christopher M. O'Meara pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Contra Costa Water District, Mary A. Zeeb, City of Auburn, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, City of Burbank, Zenith Insurance Co., City of San Buenaventura.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew) Modified on 1/9/2014 (jno).
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting (1353) Motion for bar and judgment reduction order in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al. (Kaplan, Lewis)
December 12, 2013 Filing 205 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (180 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 149 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 176 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 177 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 183 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 204 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 1353 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 147 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 177 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order (Unopposed Motion).. Document filed by Joseph M. Gregory. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(David, Israel)
December 12, 2013 Filing 204 MOTION for Entry of Bar and Judgment Reduction Order (Unopposed Motion). Document filed by Joseph M. Gregory.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(David, Israel)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (1330) Motion for Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG; granting (176) Motion for Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-01238-LAK; granting (197) Motion for Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-01239-LAK; granting (173) Motion for Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-01944-LAK; granting (170) Motion for Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-03474-LAK; granting (170) Motion for Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-03475-LAK; granting (169) Motion for Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-03476-LAK; granting (140) Motion for Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-06652-LAK; granting (142) Motion for Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order in case 1:09-cv-06040-LAK. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al. (lmb)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 BAR AND JUDGMENT REDUCTION ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Bar Order Defendants and the other Releasees are discharged from all claims for contribution and all claims for indemnification, however styled, by any person or entity, whether arising under state, federal or common law, based upon, arising from, relating to, or in connection with the Plaintiffs' Released Claims released in the Settlement Agreement (together, "Contribution Claims"). Accordingly, to the fullest extent provided by law, the Court bars, enjoins, and restrains any and all Contribution Claims (a) against the Bar Order Defendants and the other Releasees, or (b) against Ernst & Young by any or all of the Bar Order Defendants and the other Releasees, their insurers, subrogees, or assigns, or anyone acting on behalf of the Bar Order Defendants, the other Releasees, their insurers, subrogees, or assigns. 2. In the event Plaintiffs, or any of them, seek to recover damages or any other form of monetary relief ("Damages") from any person or entity based upon, arising from, relating to, or in connection with the Plaintiffs' Released Claims released in the Settlement Agreement, any verdict or judgment in such action in favor of Plaintiffs, or any of them, shall be reduced by the greater of: (a) the amount of recovery obtained by the Plaintiff(s) in connection with the Settlement Agreement; or (b) the amount of any and all of the Bar Order Defendants' percentage share of responsibility for the Damages. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(lmb)
December 2, 2013 Filing 201 STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report In Response To Pretrial Order No. 79 Document filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Government of Guam Retirement Fund, Northern Ireland Local Governmental Officers Superannuation Committee, Operating Engineers Local 3 Trust Fund, The City of Edinburgh Council as Administering Authority of the Lothian Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Berger, Max)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUSPENSION OF ACTIONS: Expert Discovery due by 2/28/2014., Motions due by 3/28/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/27/2014., Responses due by 4/28/2014., Replies due by 5/19/2014. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/19/2013) (lmb) Modified on 11/21/2013 (lmb).
November 11, 2013 Filing 199 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Unopposed Motion For Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order And Memorandum of Law In Support on 11/11/2013. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Roland A. Hernandez, Marsha Johnson Evans, Henry Kaufman. (Wasserman, Adam)
November 11, 2013 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #197 MOTION Unopposed Motion For Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order.. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Roland A. Hernandez, Marsha Johnson Evans, Henry Kaufman. (Wasserman, Adam)
November 11, 2013 Filing 197 MOTION Unopposed Motion For Entry of Bar And Judgment Reduction Order. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Roland A. Hernandez, Marsha Johnson Evans, Henry Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wasserman, Adam)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 79 (STATUS REPORT): On or before December 2, 2013, counsel shall submit a joint status report fully advising the Court as to the status of all cases under this MDL. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/1/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(lmb)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER in case 1:08-cv-05523-LAK-GWG; granting (1273) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al. (Kaplan, Lewis)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER in case 1:08-cv-05523-LAK-GWG; granting (1172) Motion for Margaret E Onasch to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al. (Kaplan, Lewis)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Ranah L. Esmaili dated 10/28/2013 re: Counsel for defendant Williams Capital Group L.P. write to request the court grant me leave to withdraw my appearance, and to be removed from the ecf service list. The reason for the request is that I will be leaving Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP at the end of this month. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/31/2013) (js)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUSPENSION OF ACTIONS AS AGAINST THE INDIVIDUAL LEHMAN DEFENDANTS: All parties to the referenced actions jointly stipulate to the following: 1. Other than settlement proceedings, all ongoing proceedings in the referenced actions shall be suspended as against the Individual Lehman Defendants in order to facilitate the parties' settlement agreement and the filing with the Court of the appropriate bar order motions, among other things. 2. The parties to this Stipulation reserve all rights available to them. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/31/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(lmb)
October 28, 2013 Filing 191 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tameka Melissa Beckford-Young on behalf of The Williams Capital Group, LLP. (Beckford-Young, Tameka)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUSPENSION OF ACTIONS AS AGAINST THE INDIVIDUAL LEHMAN DEFENDANTS: 1. Other than settlement proceedings, all ongoing proceedings in the referenced actions shall be suspended as against the Individual Lehman Defendants in order to facilitate the parties' settlement agreement and the filing with the Court of the appropriate bar order motions, among other things. 2. The parties to this Stipulation reserve all rights available to them. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/16/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(lmb)
October 7, 2013 Filing 189 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Patricia M. Hynes dated 9/30/2013 re: We are submitting this letter on behalf of the Individual Defendants and the Plaintiffs in the above-referenced eight individual actions (collectively, the "Certain California Actions"), to inform the Court that these parties have entered into an agreement settling these cases as against the Individual Defendants. ENDORSEMENT: This application should be made on notice to all parties absent consent of all parties. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/7/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(lmb)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-03468-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-03467-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-05523-LAK-GWG; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01236-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-05598-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-06762-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-08225-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-09404-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-09578-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-09793-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-10008-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-10058-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-10206-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-10686-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01237-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01231-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01238-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01232-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01240-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01235-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01230-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01239-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01944-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01946-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-01943-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-02363-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-03474-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-03475-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-03476-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-03478-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-03480-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-06041-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-06652-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-06040-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-07877-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-07878-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-cv-07900-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:10-cv-03190-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:10-cv-02926-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:10-cv-05201-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:08-cv-06626-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:10-cv-06077-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:10-cv-06185-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:10-cv-06637-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:10-cv-08631-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-00384-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-01281-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-02039-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-03552-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-03892-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-09001-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-05112-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-04278-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:10-cv-05617-LAK; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-03745-LAK; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting (1274) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting [] Motion for Issuance of L
August 19, 2013 Filing 187 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Kimberly A. Justice dated 7/31/13 re: Counsel hereby withdraws the Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Alternative Service of a Subpoena on a Non-Party, filed on May 20, 2013, Docket Nos. 1211 through 1213. ENDORSEMENT: Motion withdrawn. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/19/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
July 29, 2013 Filing 186 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Michael P. Daly as Counsel for Ernst & Young LLP. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Daly, Michael)
June 12, 2013 Filing 185 MOTION Motion to Depose Party Bank Defendants Pursuant to Civil Procedure 30(b)(6). Document filed by The Moody Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Kirkpatrick, Eric)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (1196) Motion for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG; granting (164) Motion for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01238-LAK; granting (183) Motion for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01239-LAK; granting (161) Motion for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01944-LAK; granting (158) Motion for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03474-LAK; granting (158) Motion for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03475-LAK; granting (157) Motion for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03476-LAK; granting (128) Motion for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06652-LAK; granting (130) Motion for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06040-LAK; granting (65) Motion for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-05617-LAK. It is hereby Ordered that Wayne I. Pollock is admitted Pro Hac Vice to appear as counsel for Defendants Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, and John D. Macomber in the above-captioned actions. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro) Modified on 6/10/2013 (mro).
May 8, 2013 Filing 183 MOTION for Wayne I. Pollock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8493359. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Marsha Johnson Evans, Michael L. Ainsle, Roger S. Berland, Christopher Gent, Marsha Johnson Evans, John F Akers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit New Jersey Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Pollock, Wayne)
May 1, 2013 Filing 182 AMENDED ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Christopher M. O'Meara. (Goldman, Daniel)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 65 (Amendment To Pretrial Order No. 57: Stipulation and Order For the Production And Exchange of Confidential Information). IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED and ORDERED that Pretrial Order No. 57 is amended, as follows: 1. Neither the terms of Pretrial Order No. 57, as amended, nor any other Order entered in the Lehman MDL shall prevent deposition transcripts, and exhibits thereto, taken in the Lehman MDL from being disclosed to the parties in the NYAG Action and used in the NYAG Action, subject to the rulings of this Court, and provided that such transcripts and exhibits thereto designated as "Confidential" in the Lehman MDL will be treated as "Confidential" in the NYAG Action in accordance with a protective order entered by the court in the NYAG Action. The preceding sentence does not apply to the Starr Materials, and the Starr Materials shall not be shared with the parties in the NYAG Action without further order of this Court. Neither the terms of Pretrial Order No. 57, as amended, nor any other Order entered in the Lehman MDL shall prevent the NYAG from attending and examining witnesses at any deposition in the Coordinated Actions, (excluding only the Starr depositions) provided that any such examination: (1) follows consultation with the Executive Committee regarding such participation; (2) follows the examinations conducted by the parties in the Lehman MDL (unless the cross-examining parties waive this right and allow the NYAG to proceed immediately after the direct examination); and (3) does not count against the parties' time for examination in the Lehman MDL. Copies of all transcripts, whether written or video, and exhibits thereto, of testimony taken in connection with the NYAG Action, regardless of when taken, shall be made available to the parties in the Lehman MDL promptly upon receipt by the parties to the NYAG Action of any such transcript and exhibits thereto or request by the parties in the Lehman MDL, provided that such transcripts and exhibits thereto designated as "Confidential" in the NYAG Action will be treated as "Confidential" in the Lehman MDL in accordance with Pretrial Order No. 57. Copies of all transcripts, whether written or video, and exhibits thereto, of depositions taken in the Lehman MDL (excluding only the Starr Materials) shall be made available to the NYAG promptly upon request by the NYAG of any such transcript and exhibits thereto, provided that such transcripts and exhibits thereto designated as "Confidential" in the Lehman MDL will be treated as "Confidential" in the NYAG Action in accordance with a confidentiality stipulation and order entered in the Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. The parties to the NYAG Action shall submit a confidentiality stipulation and form of protective order to the Supreme Court of New York, County of New York in the form of Exhibit A attached hereto. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER in case 1:08-cv-05523-LAK-GWG; granting (1152) Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-02926-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01236-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01237-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01238-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06652-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-05112-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04278-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-05617-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03468-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03467-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05523-LAK-GWG; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05598-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06762-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-08225-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09404-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09578-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09793-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10008-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10058-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10206-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10686-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01231-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01232-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01240-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01235-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01230-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01239-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01944-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01946-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01943-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-02363-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03474-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03475-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03476-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03478-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03480-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06041-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06040-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07877-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07878-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07900-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-03190-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-05201-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06626-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-06077-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-06185-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-06637-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-08631-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-00384-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-01281-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-02039-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-03552-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-03892-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09001-LAK; granting [] Motion for Tara Church to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-03745-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-02926-LAK et al.(Kaplan, Lewis)
March 7, 2013 Filing 179 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/17/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
March 7, 2013 Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/17/2013 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
February 27, 2013 Filing 177 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas James McKenna on behalf of Alex E. Rinehart. New Address: Gainey McKenna & Egleston, 440 Park Avenue South, 5th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10016, 2129831300. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McKenna, Thomas)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 PRETRIAL ORDER No. 61 filed. Initial disclosures completed on or before 2/22/2013. Fact Discovery cutoff on or before 10/4/2013. Expert Discovery cutoff on or before 12/20/2013. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed in the Coordinated Actions on or before January 20, 2014; any opposition to a motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before February 21, 2014; and any reply brief in support of a motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before March 14, 2014. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order for the Coordinated Actions shall be submitted on or before April I, 2014. Trial of the Class Action shall proceed before trial of any of the Individual Actions, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/23/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(cd)
January 23, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 12/20/2013. Fact Discovery due by 10/4/2013. Motions for summary judgment due by 1/20/2014. Responses due by 2/21/2014 Replies due by 3/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(cd)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 57 (Stipulation and Order for the Production and Exchange of Confidential Material): 1. All Confidential Discovery Material, and any documents or information derived therefrom, shall be used solely for purposes of the Actions and may not be used for any other purpose whatsoever, including but not limited to, any business or commercial purpose, for dissemination to the media or the public, or in connection with any other judicial, administrative, or arbitral proceeding. Parties and their agents shall use reasonable steps to safeguard the confidentiality of all Confidential Discovery Material. The attorneys of record for the Parties and all other persons receiving information governed by this Stipulation and Order for the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information ("Stipulation and Order") shall take all reasonable steps to ensure that the information and Confidential Discovery Material governed by this Stipulation and Order are (i) used only for the purposes specified herein; and (ii) disclosed only to authorized persons. 2. Any person or entity, whether a party or non-party, producing Discovery Material in the Actions (a "Producing Party") may designate Discovery Material produced by it as "Confidential" if the Producing Party believes in good faith that such Discovery Material contains or reflects nonpublic confidential, personal, financial, proprietary, or commercially sensitive information (all such designated material being referred to as "Confidential Discovery Material"). All information derived from Confidential Discovery Material, including but not limited to extracts, summaries, and descriptions of such material, shall be treated as confidential in accordance with the provisions of this Stipulation and Order. Any Party receiving Confidential Discovery Material (a "Receiving Party") may object to the "Confidential" designation and request the removal of such designation as outlined under the procedures in paragraph 12 of this Stipulation and Order; as further set forth herein. ENDORSEMENT: Notwithstanding anything to the contrary herein: 1.Any papers filed under seal in this action shall be made part of the public record on or after 1/17/13 unless the Court otherwise orders. 2.Any person may apply to the Court for access to any papers filed under seal pursuant to this order. Should such an application be made, the person or persons who designated the sealed material as Confidential shall have the burden of establishing good cause for the continuation of the sealing order unless the Court previously made an individualized determination of the existence of good cause for sealing. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(mro)
January 16, 2013 Filing 174 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diarra Mari Guthrie on behalf of Ian Lowitt Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Guthrie, Diarra)
January 15, 2013 Filing 173 STATUS REPORT. Response To Pretrial Order No. 44 (Pending Motions To Dismiss; Status Conference) Document filed by Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Government of Guam Retirement Fund, Northern Ireland Local Governmental Officers Superannuation Committee, Operating Engineers Local 3 Trust Fund, The City of Edinburgh Council as Administering Authority of the Lothian Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Pretrial Order (Pretrial Schedule and Coordinated Discovery Order), #2 Exhibit A [Proposed] Pretrial Order (Creation of a Document Depository), #3 Exhibit B [Proposed] Pretrial Order (Stipulation and Order for Production and Exchange of Confidential Information))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Stickney, David)
January 3, 2013 Filing 172 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/18/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
January 3, 2013 Filing 171 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/18/2012 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
December 12, 2012 Filing 170 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Quinn English on behalf of Erin M. Callan, Erin Callan. New Address: Finn Dixon & Herling LLP, 177 Broad Street, 15th Floor, Stamford, Connecticut, USA 06901, 203-325-5000. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(English, Michael)
December 4, 2012 Filing 169 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Ian Lowitt.(Liman, Lewis)
December 4, 2012 Filing 168 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Yury Livshiz on behalf of Ian Lowitt Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Livshiz, David)
December 4, 2012 Filing 167 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis J. Liman on behalf of Ian Lowitt Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Liman, Lewis)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 PRETRIAL ORDER NO 44: The Court has considered the responses to Pretrial No. 38 and rules as follows: The Court sees no reason to revisit the rulings made In re Lehman Bros. Secur. and ERISA Litig., 799F Supp.2d 258(S.D.N.Y. 2011) (the "Class Action"), or In re Lehman Bros. Secur. and ERISA Litig., F. Supp. 2d No. 09 MD 2017(LAK), 2012 WL 4866504 (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 15, 2012) (the "California Cases"), as to the sufficiency of allegations of misstatements, omissions and,where applicable, scienter or those bearing on the principles of law governing the timeliness of claims brought under the Securities Act of 1933 or the Securities Exchange Act of 1934. Counsel should expect that these holdings will be incorporated in rulings on the various pending motions, many of which also involve other issues. 2. The parties shall meet and confer, on or before December 23, 2012, with a view to agreeing on a proposed scheduling order that will require conclusion of all discovery in the coming year and on such other matters as may facilitate the preparation of these cases for dispositive motions and, if appropriate, trial. The parties shall submit any joint proposal or, failing agreement, their respective separate proposals to the Court by January 15, 2013. In the event separate proposals are submitted, there shall be no more than one on behalf of plaintiffs and one on behalf of defendants, in each case noting any separate positions of members of these groups. The proposals shall not exceed fifteen pages. 3. The Court will conduct a status and scheduling conference on January 17, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/4/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(js)
November 30, 2012 Filing 165 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Erin Callan, Erin M. Callan.(Pavlis, Alfred)
November 30, 2012 Filing 164 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Roland A. Hernandez, Marsha Johnson Evans, Henry Kaufman.(Wasserman, Adam)
November 30, 2012 Filing 163 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Christopher M. O'Meara.(Klein, Joshua)
November 30, 2012 Filing 162 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Steven Gora on behalf of Erin M. Callan, Erin Callan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Gora, Richard)
November 30, 2012 Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Quinn English on behalf of Erin Callan, Erin M. Callan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(English, Michael)
November 30, 2012 Filing 160 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Steven Fishman on behalf of Richard S. Fuld, Jr Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Fishman, Todd)
November 30, 2012 Filing 159 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia M. Hynes on behalf of Richard S. Fuld, Jr Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Hynes, Patricia)
November 30, 2012 Filing 158 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Kathleen Fuld.(Hynes, Patricia)
November 30, 2012 Filing 157 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Richard S. Fuld, Jr.(Hynes, Patricia)
November 30, 2012 Filing 156 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP.(Ruthberg, Miles)
November 5, 2012 Filing 155 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER THE CONSOLIDATED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: 1. The Lehman Individual Defendants and EY shall answer or otherwise respond to the CFAC on or before November 30, 2012. 2. The parties to this Stipulation reserve all rights available to them., John F. Akers answer due 11/30/2012; Roger S. Berlind answer due 11/30/2012; Erin M. Callan answer due 11/30/2012; Ernst & Young LLP answer due 11/30/2012; Richard S. Fuld, Jr answer due 11/30/2012; Joseph M. Gregory answer due 11/30/2012; Roland A. Hernandez answer due 11/30/2012; Henry Kaufman answer due 11/30/2012; Ian Lowitt answer due 11/30/2012; Christopher M. O'Meara answer due 11/30/2012; Marsha Johnson Evans answer due 11/30/2012; John F Akers answer due 11/30/2012; Marsha Johnson Evans answer due 11/30/2012; Ernst & Young LLP answer due 11/30/2012. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(lmb)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 41: The dates set forth in paragraph 2 of Pretrial Order No. 38 are extended to and including November 13 and November 27, 2012, respectively. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(lmb)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 40 (Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint): The Motion to Dismiss is granted as to all Securities Act claims of plaintiffs City of Auburn, Contra Costa Water District, Mary A. Zeeb, Monterey County Treasurer, and Zenith, as these claims are barred by the three-year statute of repose. The Motion to Dismiss is granted as to the Securities Act claims of plaintiffs City of Burbank, San Mateo County, and the Vallejo Sanitation & Flood District with respect to the securities bearing CUSIP numbers 52517PG96, 52517PXUO, 52517PC58, 52517PYN5, and 525 I 7PXT3, as these claims are barred by the three-year statute of repose. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(ft)
October 25, 2012 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (100 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK) Pretrial Order to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(ft)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 PRETRIAL ORDER No 38 (Order to Show Cause- Motions to Dismiss Individual Actions) : the parties shall show cause why an order should not be entered: Granting the pending motions to dismiss all federal securities law and common law fraud claims asserted in these cases to the extent such claims were dismissed in the Class Action and California Actions and (b) otherwise denying the pending motions, that denial to be without prejudice to the assertion of any other state law grounds on motions for summary judgment dismissing individual actions at the conclusion of discovery, and 2. Lifting the stay of discovery and holding a conference to fix a discovery schedule and plan. Submissions in opposition to relief proposed in this order to show cause shall be filed no later than November 5, 2012. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. ( Responses due by 11/5/2012) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(pl)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM OPINION: The Underwriter Defendants motions to dismiss the CFAC [09 MD 2017, DI 574; DI 596] are granted.250 HVBs motion to dismiss [09 MD 2017, DI 598] is granted to the extent it is asserted against the cases included in the CFAC.251 The Individual Defendants motion to dismiss the CFAC [09 MD 2017, DI 633] is granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. Ernst & Youngs motion to dismiss [DI 623] to the extent it is asserted against the cases included in the CFAC252 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. The defendants shall settle an order more fully setting forth the rulings made above. The Court would be grateful for an order agreed as to form by all parties. Absent agreement, defendants shall settle their proposed order, on seven days notice. The agreed or proposed order shall be submitted no later than October 24, 2012. re: (633 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint by the Lehman Individual Defendants. filed by Roland A. Hernandez, John F Akers, John F. Akers, Henry Kaufman, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Marsha Johnson Evans, (574 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by Bank Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint, dated January 6, 2012. filed by Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., RBS Greenwich Capital, BNP Paribas S.A., Daiwa Securities SMBC Europe Limited, Calyon Securities (USA) Inc., Ing Financial Markets LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Siebert Capital Markets, Fortis Securities, LLC, Banc of America Securities LLC, ABN AMRO Holding N.V., SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Harris Nesbitt Corp., BBVA Securities Inc., Natixis Bleichroeder Inc., Loop Capital Markets, LLC, ANZ Securities, Inc., Santander Investment Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, (596 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by HVB Capital Markets Inc. to Dismiss Certain Individual Actions. filed by HVB Capital Markets, Inc., (623 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss --Motions to Dismiss and Joinders in Motions to Dismiss Certain Individual Actions. filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(pl)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 PRETRIAL ORDER No. 37. (Motion to Lift PSLRA Stay): The motion to partially lift the PSLRA discovery stay (09 MD 2017 DI 978) is denied. The Clerk shall spread the docket entry to all cases to which this order applies. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(pl)
August 13, 2012 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (978 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 88 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 139 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 115 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 97 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 123 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 76 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 60 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 100 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 99 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 106 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 129 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 116 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 119 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 116 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 75 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 139 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 86 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 59 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK) MOTION to Partially Lift Discovery Stay by the Individual Action Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Contra Costa Water District, American National Insurance Company, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of Cerritos, City of Fremont, City of Long Beach, City of San Buenaventura, City of South San Francisco, County of Alameda, County of Tuolumne, San Mateo County Investment Pool, The California Public Employees' Retirement System, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
August 3, 2012 Filing 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of THE WILLIAMS CAPITAL GROUP, L.P.S JOINDER TO BANK DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO INDIVIDUAL ACTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PARTIALLY LIFT THE DISCOVERY STAY on 8/2/2012. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Williams Capital Group L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 1:09-cv-02363-LAK(Esmaili, Ranah)
August 2, 2012 Filing 147 JOINDER to join re: (121 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 92 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 105 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 65 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK, 200 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 122 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 66 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 82 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 106 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 112 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 80 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 129 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 103 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 122 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 145 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 995 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 125 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 135 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 81 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,, Opposition to the Individual Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Lift the Discovery Stay. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Michael L. Ainslie, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Christopher Gent, John d. Macomber, Christopher Gent, Sir, John D. Macomber, Sir Christopher Gent, Michael Ainslie, Roland Hernandez, John F Akers, Marsha Johnson Evans. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Afffidavit of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Wasserman, Adam)
August 2, 2012 Filing 146 JOINDER to join re: (995 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,, THE WILLIAMS CAPITAL GROUP, L.P.S JOINDER TO BANK DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO INDIVIDUAL ACTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PARTIALLY LIFT THE DISCOVERY STAY. Document filed by Williams Capital Group L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 1:09-cv-02363-LAK(Esmaili, Ranah)
August 2, 2012 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (978 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 88 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 139 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 74 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 115 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 97 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 123 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 76 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 60 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 100 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 99 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 106 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 129 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 116 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 119 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 116 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 75 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 86 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 59 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK) MOTION to Partially Lift Discovery Stay by the Individual Action Plaintiffs.. Document filed by A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN AMRO Holding N.V., ABN AMRO Inc., ANZ Securities, Inc., BBVA Securities Inc., BNP Paribas S.A., BNY Capital Markets, Inc., Banc of America Securities LLC, Banca IMI, S.p.A., CIBC World Markets Corp., Caja de Ahorros y Monte de Piedad de Madrid, Calyon Securities (USA) Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., Countrywide Securities Corp., DZ Financial Markets LLC, Daiwa Securities SMBC Europe Limited, Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., Fidelity Capital Markets Services, Fortis Securities, LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Harris Nesbitt Corp., Hypo Capital Markets, Inc., Ing Financial Markets LLC, LaSalle Financial Services, inc., Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., National Australia Capital Markets, LLC, Natixis Bleichroeder Inc., RBC Capital Markets Corp., RBS Greenwich Capital, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, Santander Investment Securities Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Siebert Capital Markets, Sovereign Securities Corporation LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Suntrust Capital Markets, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Utendahl Capital Partners, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Zions Direct, UBS Investment Bank, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wachovia Securities. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Lowenthal, Mitchell)
August 2, 2012 Filing 144 DECLARATION of David E. Haller, dated August 2, 2012 in Opposition re: (88 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 139 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 74 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 115 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 97 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 123 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 76 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 60 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 106 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 129 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 116 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 86 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 978 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 99 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 100 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 119 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 116 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 75 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 59 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK) MOTION to Partially Lift Discovery Stay by the Individual Action Plaintiffs.. Document filed by A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN AMRO Holding N.V., ABN AMRO Inc., ANZ Securities, Inc., BBVA Securities Inc., BNP Paribas S.A., BNY Capital Markets, Inc., Banc of America Securities LLC, Banca IMI, S.p.A., CIBC World Markets Corp., Caja de Ahorros y Monte de Piedad de Madrid, Calyon Securities (USA) Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., Countrywide Securities Corp., DZ Financial Markets LLC, Daiwa Securities SMBC Europe Limited, Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., Fidelity Capital Markets Services, Fortis Securities, LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Harris Nesbitt Corp., Hypo Capital Markets, Inc., Ing Financial Markets LLC, LaSalle Financial Services, inc., Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., National Australia Capital Markets, LLC, Natixis Bleichroeder Inc., RBC Capital Markets Corp., RBS Greenwich Capital, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, Santander Investment Securities Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Siebert Capital Markets, Sovereign Securities Corporation LLC, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Suntrust Capital Markets, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Utendahl Capital Partners, L.P., Wachovia Capital Markets LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Zions Direct, UBS Investment Bank, Wachovia Securities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Lowenthal, Mitchell)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, that the law firm of Finn Dixon & Herling LLP hereby is substituted in place and in the stead of the law firm Proskauer Rose LLP as counsel of record for defendant Erin M. Callin in the following actions as further set forth in this order., Attorney Seth David Fier; Dietrich L. Snell; Robert J. Cleary and Mark Edward Davidson terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/18/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(lmb)
July 17, 2012 Filing 142 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 6/21/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 17, 2012 Filing 141 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 6/21/2012 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 16, 2012 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (97 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 32 in 1:11-cv-09001-LAK, 73 in 1:09-cv-03480-LAK, 88 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 193 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 139 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 74 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 25 in 1:11-cv-04278-LAK, 115 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 97 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 103 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 123 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 438 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK-GWG, 44 in 1:10-cv-03190-LAK, 76 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 60 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 55 in 1:09-cv-07900-LAK, 64 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 106 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 129 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 56 in 1:10-cv-08631-LAK, 105 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 150 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 36 in 1:11-cv-03552-LAK, 72 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK, 38 in 1:10-cv-05617-LAK, 96 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 24 in 1:11-cv-05112-LAK, 27 in 1:10-cv-06077-LAK, 116 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 25 in 1:11-cv-02039-LAK, 190 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 72 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 139 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 86 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 978 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG, 199 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 76 in 1:10-cv-06637-LAK, 98 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 92 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 52 in 1:11-cv-00384-LAK, 96 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 100 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 99 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 71 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK, 45 in 1:10-cv-02926-LAK, 108 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 84 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 119 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 116 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 75 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 42 in 1:08-cv-06626-LAK, 59 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK, 104 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK) MOTION to Partially Lift Discovery Stay by the Individual Action Plaintiffs.. Document filed by American National Insurance Company, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of Cerritos, City of Fremont, City of Long Beach, City of San Buenaventura, City of South San Francisco, Contra Costa Water District, County of Alameda, County of Tuolumne, San Mateo County Investment Pool, State Compensation Insurance Fund, The California Public Employees' Retirement System, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Washington State Investment Board, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
July 16, 2012 Filing 139 MOTION to Partially Lift Discovery Stay by the Individual Action Plaintiffs. Document filed by American National Insurance Company, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of Cerritos, City of Fremont, City of Long Beach, City of San Buenaventura, City of South San Francisco, Contra Costa Water District, County of Tuolumne, San Mateo County Investment Pool, State Compensation Insurance Fund, The California Public Employees' Retirement System, The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Washington State Investment Board, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK-GWG et al.(Edling, Matthew)
March 7, 2012 Filing 138 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Plaintiff's Omnibus Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Strike and to Dismiss the Amended Complaint re: (739 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
March 6, 2012 Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion re: (79 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 78 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 148 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 600 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss., (158 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint., (582 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Incapital LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Boyd, David)
March 5, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney David R. Boyd to RE-FILE Document (108 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 102 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 90 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 93 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 115 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 131 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 22 in 1:11-cv-02039-LAK, 90 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 50 in 1:10-cv-08631-LAK, 40 in 1:10-cv-03190-LAK, 185 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 88 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 134 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 66 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 49 in 1:09-cv-07900-LAK, 33 in 1:11-cv-03552-LAK, 40 in 1:10-cv-02926-LAK, 88 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 50 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK, 63 in 1:10-cv-06637-LAK, 95 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 70 in 1:09-cv-03480-LAK, 178 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 92 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 91 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 65 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 61 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 111 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 47 in 1:11-cv-00384-LAK, 69 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK, 187 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 80 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 50 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 94 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 123 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 105 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 25 in 1:11-cv-09001-LAK, 66 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 89 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 24 in 1:10-cv-06077-LAK, 78 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 774 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 68 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK, 69 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 81 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 93 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 336 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK, 108 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 107 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 39 in 1:08-cv-06626-LAK, 147 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK) Reply to Response to Motion. ERROR(S): No signature or s/. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(db)
March 5, 2012 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of the Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Wasserman, Adam)
March 5, 2012 Filing 135 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (63 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 633 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 114 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 65 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 98 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 102 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 95 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 95 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint by the Lehman Individual Defendants.. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Marsha Johnson Evans, John F Akers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Wasserman, Adam)
March 5, 2012 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
March 5, 2012 Filing 133 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (35 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 623 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 52 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 55 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 91 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 117 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 80 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 77 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 91 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 98 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 34 in 1:10-cv-02926-LAK, 59 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 54 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 32 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK, 83 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 79 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 61 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 90 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 19 in 1:11-cv-09001-LAK, 110 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss --Motions to Dismiss and Joinders in Motions to Dismiss Certain Individual Actions.. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Authority)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
March 5, 2012 Filing 132 DECLARATION of /Reply Declaration of Brendan H. Gibbon in Further Support of the Bank Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints in the Consolidated Lehman Securities Actions, dated March 5, 2012 re (587), (594), (568), (569), (574), (577), (701), (713) and (715) in case no. 09MD2017 in Support. Document filed by A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN AMRO Holding N.V., ABN AMRO Inc., ANZ Securities, Inc., BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas S.A., BNY Capital Markets, Inc., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Banc of America Securities LLC, Banca IMI, S.p.A., CIBC World Markets Corp., Caja de Ahorros y Monte de Piedad de Madrid, Calyon Securities (USA) Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., Countrywide Securities Corp., DZ Financial Markets LLC, Daiwa Securities SMBC Europe Limited, Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., Fidelity Capital Markets Services, Fortis Securities, LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Hypo Capital Markets, Inc., Ing Financial Markets LLC, LaSalle Financial Services, inc., Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., National Australia Bank Limited, National Australia Capital Markets, LLC, Natixis Bleichroeder Inc., RBC Capital Markets Corp., RBS Greenwich Capital, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, Santander Investment Securities Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Siebert Capital Markets, Sovereign Securities Corporation LLC, Standard Chartered Bank, Suntrust Capital Markets, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Utendahl Capital Partners, L.P., Wachovia Capital Markets LLC, Wachovia Securities, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Zions Direct, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Lowenthal, Mitchell)
March 5, 2012 Filing 131 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY to Response to Motion re: (79 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 78 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 148 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 600 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss., (158 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint., (582 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Incapital LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Boyd, David) Modified on 3/6/2012 (db).
March 5, 2012 Filing 130 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support /Bank Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint, dated March 5, 2012 re 577 , 574 and 715 in case no. 09MD2017. Document filed by ABN AMRO Holding N.V., ANZ Securities, Inc., BBVA Securities Inc., BNP Paribas S.A., Banc of America Securities LLC, Calyon Securities (USA) Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., Daiwa Securities SMBC Europe Limited, Fortis Securities, LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Harris Nesbitt Corp., Ing Financial Markets LLC, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Natixis Bleichroeder Inc., RBS Greenwich Capital, SG Americas Securities LLC, Santander Investment Securities Inc., Siebert Capital Markets, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Lowenthal, Mitchell)
February 13, 2012 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (103 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 73 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 71 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 103 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 660 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 106 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 125 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 110 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 102 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Joinder in the Bank Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint., (574 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 103 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 85 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 86 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 56 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 86 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 89 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 54 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 93 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by Bank Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint, dated January 6, 2012., (596 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by HVB Capital Markets Inc. to Dismiss Certain Individual Actions., (114 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 65 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 98 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 102 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 95 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 63 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 633 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 95 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint by the Lehman Individual Defendants., (91 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 59 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 83 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 110 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 623 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 91 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 98 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 61 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 90 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss --Motions to Dismiss and Joinders in Motions to Dismiss Certain Individual Actions.. Document filed by Contra Costa Water District, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Edling, Matthew)
January 31, 2012 Filing 128 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Matthew K. Edling dated 1/24/2012 re: counsel for plaintiffs respectfully requests permission to file one omnibus opposition not to exceed 50 pages in response to the four motions to dismiss and two joinders that were filed on January 6, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/31/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(pl)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Pursuant to Rule 1.3 of the Local Rules of the United States Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, I David M. Furbush, hereby move this Court for an Order for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice to appear as counsel for defendant The Williams Capital Group, L.P. in the above-captioned action. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/23/2012) (lmb)
January 18, 2012 Filing 126 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on (67 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 145 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 116 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 29 in 1:10-cv-02926-LAK, 42 in 1:09-cv-07900-LAK, 92 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 175 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 127 in 1:10-cv-06185-LAK, 91 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 37 in 1:08-cv-06626-LAK, 43 in 1:10-cv-06637-LAK, 27 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 77 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 52 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 75 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 63 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK, 75 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 82 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 60 in 1:09-cv-03480-LAK, 48 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 89 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 74 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 50 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 99 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 76 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 185 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 23 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK, 308 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK, 87 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 16 in 1:11-cv-09001-LAK, 82 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 103 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 20 in 1:10-cv-06077-LAK, 100 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 32 in 1:10-cv-03190-LAK, 51 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 33 in 1:10-cv-08631-LAK, 81 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 59 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 144 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 73 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 65 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK, 50 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 553 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 85 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 76 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 79 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 29 in 1:11-cv-03552-LAK, 35 in 1:11-cv-00384-LAK, 74 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 79 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 18 in 1:11-cv-02039-LAK) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL filed by Incapital LLC: Construing this as a motion to withdraw, granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/17/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al. (ab)
January 12, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Joseph Angelo Mendola to RE-FILE Document (103 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 125 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 73 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 71 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 110 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 103 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 660 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 102 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 106 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Joinder in the Bank Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint., (658 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 38 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss - Joinder in Bank Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint., (40 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 659 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss - Joinder to the Bank Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Use the event type Joinder found under the event list Other Documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(ldi)
January 12, 2012 Filing 125 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss Joinder in the Bank Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint. Document filed by M.R. Beal & Co., M.R. Beal & Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Mendola, Joseph) Modified on 1/13/2012 (ldi).
January 12, 2012 Filing 124 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Angelo Mendola on behalf of M.R. Beal & Company, M.R. Beal & Co. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Mendola, Joseph)
January 11, 2012 Filing 123 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on (653) Motion for Bryan M. Payne to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK; granting (121) Motion for Bryan M. Payne to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01239-LAK. Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK(ft)
January 10, 2012 Filing 122 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT DAVID GOLDFARB ONLY: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed against the defendant(s) David Goldfarb. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/10/12) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(pl) Modified on 1/10/2012 (pl).
January 9, 2012 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Joinder in Bank Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint - Dkt. No. 616 on 01/06/2012. Document filed by The Williams Capital Group L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Esmaili, Ranah)
January 9, 2012 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance for David A. Crichlow and Notice of Appearance for Ranah L. Esmaili on 01/06/2012. Document filed by The Williams Capital Group L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK(Esmaili, Ranah)
January 9, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Matthew Edling Document (107 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 92 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 89 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 608 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 57 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 88 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 96 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 59 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 89 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,, was referred to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan for approval. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(dt)
January 7, 2012 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Roland A. Hernandez, Marsha Johnson Evans, Henry Kaufman. (Wasserman, Adam)
January 7, 2012 Filing 117 DECLARATION of Adam J. Wasserman Esq., in Support re: #114 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint by the Lehman Individual Defendants.. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Roland A. Hernandez, Marsha Johnson Evans, Henry Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit N, #5 Exhibit O, #6 Exhibit P, #7 Exhibit Q)(Wasserman, Adam)
January 6, 2012 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (63 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 633 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 114 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 65 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 98 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 102 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 95 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 95 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint by the Lehman Individual Defendants.. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Marsha Johnson Evans, John F Akers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Wasserman, Adam)
January 6, 2012 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Adam J. Wasserman Esq., in Support re: (114 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 65 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 98 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 102 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 95 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 63 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 633 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 95 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint by the Lehman Individual Defendants.. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Marsha Johnson Evans, John F Akers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exihbit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Wasserman, Adam)
January 6, 2012 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated First Amended Complaint by the Lehman Individual Defendants. Document filed by John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Marsha Johnson Evans, John F Akers.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Wasserman, Adam)
January 6, 2012 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
January 6, 2012 Filing 112 DECLARATION of Christopher S. Turner in Support re: (35 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 52 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 55 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 117 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 91 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 59 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 83 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 79 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 110 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 623 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 91 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 80 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 77 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 98 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 34 in 1:10-cv-02926-LAK, 54 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 32 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK, 61 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 90 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 152 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 39 in 1:10-cv-08631-LAK, 19 in 1:11-cv-09001-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss --Motions to Dismiss and Joinders in Motions to Dismiss Certain Individual Actions.. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
January 6, 2012 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (35 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 52 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 55 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 117 in 1:10-cv-05201-LAK, 91 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 59 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 83 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 79 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 94 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 110 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 623 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 91 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 80 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 77 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 98 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 34 in 1:10-cv-02926-LAK, 54 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 32 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK, 61 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 90 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 152 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 39 in 1:10-cv-08631-LAK, 19 in 1:11-cv-09001-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss --Motions to Dismiss and Joinders in Motions to Dismiss Certain Individual Actions.. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Authority)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
January 6, 2012 Filing 110 MOTION to Dismiss --Motions to Dismiss and Joinders in Motions to Dismiss Certain Individual Actions. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
January 6, 2012 Filing 109 JOINDER to join re: (574 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by Bank Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint, dated January 6, 2012.. Document filed by The Williams Capital Group, LLP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Crichlow, David)
January 6, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ranah Leila Esmaili on behalf of The Williams Capital Group, LLP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK(Esmaili, Ranah)
January 6, 2012 Filing 107 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, With prejudice against the defendant(s) David Goldfarb. Document filed by City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Edling, Matthew) Modified on 1/9/2012 (dt).
January 6, 2012 Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Andrew Crichlow, Sr on behalf of The Williams Capital Group, LLP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK(Crichlow, David)
January 6, 2012 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Brendan H. Gibbon in Support re: (574 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 103 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 85 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 86 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 56 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 86 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 89 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 54 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 93 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by Bank Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint, dated January 6, 2012., (75 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 75 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 78 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 76 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 587 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 77 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by Bank Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint, dated January 6, 2012., (145 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 575 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint., (52 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 80 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 51 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 568 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 77 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 76 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 74 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion by Bank Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint, dated January 6, 2012., (28 in 1:11-cv-01281-LAK, 557 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by Bank Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, dated January 6, 2012., (49 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 571 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint., (570 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 25 in 1:11-cv-03892-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by Bank Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, dated January 6, 2012.. Document filed by A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN AMRO Holding N.V., ABN AMRO Inc., ANZ Securities, Inc., BBVA Securities Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas S.A., BNY Capital Markets, Inc., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Banc of America Securities LLC, Banca IMI, S.p.A., CIBC World Markets Corp., Caja de Ahorros y Monte de Piedad de Madrid, Calyon Securities (USA) Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., Countrywide Securities Corp., DZ Financial Markets LLC, Daiwa Securities SMBC Europe Limited, Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., Fidelity Capital Markets Services, Fortis Securities, LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Hypo Capital Markets, Inc., Ing Financial Markets LLC, LaSalle Financial Services, inc., Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., National Australia Bank Limited, National Australia Capital Markets, LLC, Natixis Bleichroeder Inc., RBC Capital Markets Corp., RBS Greenwich Capital, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities LLC, Santander Investment Securities Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Siebert Capital Markets, Sovereign Securities Corporation LLC, Standard Chartered Bank, Suntrust Capital Markets, Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Utendahl Capital Partners, L.P., Wachovia Capital Markets LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Zions Direct, Inc., UBS Investment Bank, Wachovia Securities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-19, #2 Exhibits 20-28, #3 Exhibits 29-34, #4 Exhibits 35-39, #5 Exhibits 40-41, #6 Exhibits 42-44)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Cooper, Roger)
January 6, 2012 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (574 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 103 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 85 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 86 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 86 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 56 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 89 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 54 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 93 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by Bank Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint, dated January 6, 2012.. Document filed by ABN AMRO Holding N.V., ANZ Securities, Inc., BBVA Securities Inc., BNP Paribas S.A., Banc of America Securities LLC, Calyon Securities (USA) Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., Daiwa Securities SMBC Europe Limited, Fortis Securities, LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Harris Nesbitt Corp., Ing Financial Markets LLC, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Natixis Bleichroeder Inc., RBS Greenwich Capital, SG Americas Securities LLC, Santander Investment Securities Inc., Siebert Capital Markets, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Lowenthal, Mitchell)
January 6, 2012 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion by Bank Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint, dated January 6, 2012. Document filed by ABN AMRO Holding N.V., ANZ Securities, Inc., BBVA Securities Inc., BNP Paribas S.A., Banc of America Securities LLC, Calyon Securities (USA) Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., Daiwa Securities SMBC Europe Limited, Fortis Securities, LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Harris Nesbitt Corp., Ing Financial Markets LLC, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Natixis Bleichroeder Inc., RBS Greenwich Capital, SG Americas Securities LLC, Santander Investment Securities Inc., Siebert Capital Markets, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Responses due by 2/6/2012Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Lowenthal, Mitchell)
January 5, 2012 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ABN AMRO Holding N.V. waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; ANZ Securities, Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; BBVA Securities Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; BMO Capital Markets Corp. waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; BNP Paribas S.A. waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Banc of America Securities LLC waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp. waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Fortis Securities, LLC waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Kathleen Fuld waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; HVB Capital Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Ing Financial Markets LLC waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Loop Capital Markets, LLC waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Mellon Financial Markets, LLC waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Natixis Bleichroeder Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; RBS Greenwich Capital waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; SG Corporate & Investment Banking waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Siebert Capital Markets waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Societe General Corporate & Investment Banking waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012; Wells Fargo Securities, LLC waiver sent on 12/6/2011, answer due 2/6/2012. Document filed by City of Auburn; City of Burbank; City of San Buenaventura; Contra Costa Water District; San Mateo County Investment Pool; Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District; Mary A. Zeeb; Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Edling, Matthew)
December 22, 2011 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Anthony Sama on behalf of David Goldfarb Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Sama, Vincent)
December 22, 2011 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Barry Schumacher on behalf of David Goldfarb Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Schumacher, Catherine)
December 22, 2011 Filing 99 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Incapital LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Boyd, David)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 that Vincent Anthony Sama and Catherine Barry Schumacher hereby are substituted in place and in the stead of Michael Joseph Chepiga, Erika Hannelore Burk, Jeffrey J. Greenbaum as counsel of record for defendant David Goldfarb in underlying eight civil cases listed in this stipulation and order of substitution of counsel, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
December 13, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Steven Fishman on behalf of Kathleen Fuld Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Fishman, Todd)
December 13, 2011 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia M. Hynes on behalf of Kathleen Fuld Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Hynes, Patricia)
December 12, 2011 Filing 121 MOTION for Bryan M. Payne to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, San Mateo County Investment Pool, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District, Mary A. Zeeb, Zenith Insurance Co..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK(bwa) (bwa).
November 29, 2011 Filing 95 CONSOLIDATED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABN Amro Holdings, N.V., ANZ Securities, Inc, John F. Akers, BBVA Securities Inc., BNP Paribas S.A., Roger S. Berlind, Erin Callan, Calyon Securities (USA) Inc, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., Daiwa Capital Markets Europe Ltd., Ernst & Young LLP, Marsha Johnson Evans, Fortis Securities LLC, Kathleen Fuld, Richard S. Fuld, Jr, David Goldfarb, Joseph M. Gregory, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HVB Capital Markets Inc, Roland A. Hernandez, ING Financial Markets, LLC, Henry Kaufman, Ian Lowitt, M.R. Beal & Co., Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Natixis Bleichroeder Inc, Christopher M. O'Meara, RBS Greenwich Capital, Santander Investment Securities Inc, Societe General Corporate & Investment Banking, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Siebert Capital Markets, Bank of America Securites LLC, Harris Nesbitt with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by plaintiffs. ***Original document filed in case number 09-md-2017, document #530.(mro) (tro).
November 21, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/8/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 21, 2011 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/8/2011 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 16, 2011 Filing 92 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/8/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 16, 2011 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 11/8/2011 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Petrillo Klein LLP hereby is substituted in place and in the stead of the law flrm Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP as counsel of record for defendant Christopher M. O'Meara in these actions. Attorney Joshua Klein, Guy Petrillo for Christopher M. O'Meara added. Attorney Mary Elizabeth McGarry, Erika Hannelore Burk and Michael Joseph Chepiga terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/7/2011) (ft)
November 7, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell A. Lowenthal on behalf of BBVA Securities Inc., Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., Fortis Securities, ING Financial Markets, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Natexis Bleichroeder Inc., Sun Trust Robinson Humphrey, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC (Lowenthal, Mitchell)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 PRETRIAL ORDER No. 19: The Court will conduct a status and scheduling conference on November 8, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12D to discuss the further progress of these matters. Among subjects for discussion is the filing of a single consolidated amended complaint for all non-class action plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/11/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rdz)
October 5, 2011 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,. Kathleen Fuld served on 9/2/2011, answer due 9/23/2011. Service was accepted by Jonusz Kulinski (Co-Tenant). Document filed by The San Mateo County Investment Pool. (Edling, Matthew)
August 22, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Matthew K. Edling for noncompliance with Section 14.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #86 Amended Complaint,,, to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (mro)
August 19, 2011 Filing 86 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Erin Callan, Erin M. Callan, Ernst & Young LLP, Richard S. Fuld, Jr, David Goldfarb, Joseph M. Gregory, Roland A. Hernandez, Marsha Johnson Evans, Henry Kaufman, Ian Lowitt, Christopher M. O'Meara, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, M.R. Beal & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., The Williams Capital Group LP, Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp., Daiwa Capital Markets Europe Ltd., ING Financial Markets, Banc of America Securities LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., BBVA Securities Inc., Fortis Securities, Mellon Financial Markets, LLC, Natexis Bleichroeder Inc., Societe General Corporate & Investment Banking, Sun Trust Robinson Humphrey, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Kathleen Fuld with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by The San Mateo County Investment Pool.(mro) (ama).
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re: Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, of 425 Lexington Avenue, New York, New York 10017-3954, withdraws as counsel for defendant Joseph M. Gregory in the above-captioned proceedings. Fried, Frank, Harris, Slujver & Jacobson LLP, of One New York Plaza New York, NY 10004, will remain as attorneys of record for defendant Joseph M. Gregory in the above-captioned actions within these proceedings in which Mr. Gregory is named. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/11/2011 Part I) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al. (ab) Modified on 8/23/2011 (ab).
March 9, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, pursuant to Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules for the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York. I. Aaron M. Sheanin, a partner with the law firm of Girard Gibbs LLP, attorney for Plaintiffs Defer LP, Laurie Rubin, and Jonathan Gold in the above-entitled action, hereby withdraw as an attorney ofrecord, as I am leaving Girard Gibbs LLP. Daniel C. Girard, Jonathan K. Levine, and Christina H. C. Sharp of Girard Gibbs LLP will continue to serve as counsel of record. to Plaintiffs in the above- referenced matter. I hereby request that my name and email address be removed from the case's official docket. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/9/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(djc)
January 21, 2011 Filing 83 NOTICE of OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by City of Fremont, City of Long Beach, City of South San Francisco, County of Tuolumne, City of Cerritos, County of Alameda. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Simon, Bruce)
January 19, 2011 Filing 82 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mark Edward Davidson on behalf of Erin Callan, Erin M. Callan. New Address: Proskauer Rose LLP, Eleven Times Square, New York, NY, 10036, 212-969-3000. (Davidson, Mark)
January 18, 2011 Filing 81 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mark Edward Davidson on behalf of Erin Callan, Erin M. Callan. New Address: Proskauer Rose LLP, Eleven Times Square, New York, NY, 10036, 212-969-3000. (Davidson, Mark)
January 18, 2011 Filing 80 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Seth David Fier on behalf of Erin Callan, Erin M. Callan. New Address: Proskauer Rose LLP, Eleven Times Square, New York, NY, 10036, 212-969-3000. (Fier, Seth)
January 13, 2011 Filing 79 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert J Cleary on behalf of Erin Callan. New Address: Proskauer Rose LLP, 11 Times Square, New York, New York, 10036-8299, 212-969-3000. (Cleary, Robert)
January 11, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dietrich L. Snell on behalf of Erin Callan. New Address: Proskauer Rose LLP, Eleven TImes Square, New York, New York, 10036-8299, 212-969-3000. (Snell, Dietrich)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO UNSEAL THE SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties that: 1. The SCAC and the documents produced by Defendants that are referenced therein may be disseminated on a non-confidential basis; 2. The Court shall order the SCAC to be unsealed; and 3. Nothing in this Stipulation shall otherwise impact the October 7, 2009 Protective Order or the documents covered thereby. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/30/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al. (rjm)
September 14, 2010 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Edward Davidson on behalf of Erin Callan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Davidson, Mark)
September 14, 2010 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert J. Cleary on behalf of Erin M. Callan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Cleary, Robert)
September 14, 2010 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth David Fier on behalf of Erin M. Callan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Fier, Seth)
September 14, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dietrich L. Snell on behalf of Erin M. Callan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Snell, Dietrich)
September 9, 2010 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erika Hannelore Burk on behalf of David Goldfarb, Christopher M. O'Meara, Thomas Russo Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Burk, Erika)
September 9, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph Chepiga on behalf of David Goldfarb, Christopher M. O'Meara, Thomas Russo Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Chepiga, Michael)
September 9, 2010 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Elizabeth McGarry on behalf of David Goldfarb, Christopher M. O'Meara, Thomas Russo Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(McGarry, Mary)
June 15, 2010 Filing 69 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL (Matthew K. Edling) PRO HAC VICE. granting (223) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05523-LAK; granting (139) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05598-LAK; granting (136) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06762-LAK; granting (130) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-08225-LAK; granting (86) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09404-LAK; granting (88) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09578-LAK; granting (76) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09793-LAK; granting (65) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10008-LAK; granting (77) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10058-LAK; granting (73) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10206-LAK; granting (53) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10686-LAK; granting (292) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK; granting (50) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01236-LAK; granting (52) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01231-LAK; granting (51) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01237-LAK; granting (53) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01232-LAK; granting (65) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01238-LAK; granting (49) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01240-LAK; granting (53) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01235-LAK; granting (52) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01230-LAK; granting (68) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01239-LAK; granting (58) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01944-LAK; granting (55) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01946-LAK; granting (43) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01943-LAK; granting (100) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-02363-LAK; granting (51) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03468-LAK; granting (51) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03467-LAK; granting (53) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03474-LAK; granting (53) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03475-LAK; granting (53) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03476-LAK; granting (48) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03478-LAK; granting (44) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03480-LAK; granting (29) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06041-LAK; granting (22) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06652-LAK; granting (23) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06040-LAK; granting (25) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07877-LAK; granting (25) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07878-LAK; granting (27) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07900-LAK; granting (15) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-03190-LAK; granting (13) Motion for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-02926-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/14/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
June 1, 2010 Filing 68 MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE for Matthew K. Edling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Zenith Insurance Co & San MateoCounty Investment Pool. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al. (rjm)
May 21, 2010 Filing 67 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Imtiaz A. Siddiqui on behalf of Zenith Insurance Co., The San Mateo County Investment Pool, Lou Solton, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District. New Address: Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy (NY), One Liberty Plaza, 23rd Floor, New York, New York, United States of America 10006, 212-682-3198. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Siddiqui, Imtiaz)
April 22, 2010 Filing 66 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kenneth Mark Rehns on behalf of Boilermakers-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund(On Behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated), New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund(on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated). New Address: 88 Pine Street, 14th Floor, New York, New York, 10005,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Rehns, Kenneth)
April 22, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Daniel Brett Rehns on behalf of Boilermakers-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund(On Behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated), New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund(on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated). New Address: 88 Pine Street, 14th Floor, New York, New York, 10005,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Rehns, Daniel)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF RICHARD D. BERNSTEIN. PURSUANT TO RULE 1.3(c) of the Local Rules of the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, and upon the accompanying Affidavit, I, Kelly M. Hnatt, a member in good standing of the Bar of this Court, hereby move for an Order allowing the admission pro hac vice, as counsel for Defendant Ian Lowitt, of Richard D. Bernstein. As set forth in the accompanying Affidavit, Mr. Bernstein is a member in good standing of the Bar of the District of Columbia, and there are no pending disciplinary proceedings against him in any State or Federal court. Attorney Richard D. Bernstein for Ian Lowitt added. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/12/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
April 8, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen N. Massey on behalf of Marsha Johnson Evans Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK(Massey, Kathleen)
April 8, 2010 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Levander on behalf of Marsha Johnson Evans Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK(Levander, Andrew)
April 7, 2010 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 03/23/2010, Receipt Number 898442. (jd)
April 1, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Jay Wasserman on behalf of Marsha Johnson Evans Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK(Wasserman, Adam)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that should either party wish the Court to consider Mr. Fuld's Form U-4, it should submit, by way of affidavit, a true and correct copy to the Court no later than 1:00 pm on Monday, 4/5/10. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/31/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al. Copies sent by chambers.(cd)
March 31, 2010 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 57 Endorsed Letter. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tve)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, that the law firm of Dechert LLP hereby is substituted in place and in the stead of the law firm of Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP as counsel of record for defendants John F. Akers, Michael L. Ainslie, Roger S, Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufrnaa, and John D. Macomber in all ofthe above-captioned actions in which any such defendants are named. Attorney Andrew J. Levander for Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Christopher Gent, Ronald Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Ronald Hernandez, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainsle, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainsle, John F Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John F Akers, Roger S. Berlind, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Christopher Gent, Sir, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainsle, John F Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman and John D. Macomber, Kathleen N. Massey for Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Christopher Gent, Ronald Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Ronald Hernandez, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainsle, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainsle, John F Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John F Akers, Roger S. Berlind, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Christopher Gent, Sir, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John D. Macomber, Michael L. Ainsle, John F Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Sir, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman and John D. Macomber, Adam Jay Wasserman for Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Be
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM ENDORSEMENT re: #247 MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. ORDER granting (203) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05523-LAK; granting (129) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05598-LAK; granting (119) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06762-LAK; granting (123) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-08225-LAK; granting (79) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09404-LAK; granting (78) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09578-LAK; granting (66) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09793-LAK; granting (58) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10008-LAK; granting (70) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10058-LAK; granting (66) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10206-LAK; granting (47) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10686-LAK; granting (247) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK; granting (43) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01236-LAK; granting (45) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01231-LAK; granting (44) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01237-LAK; granting (46) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01232-LAK; granting (57) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01238-LAK; granting (43) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01240-LAK; granting (46) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01235-LAK; granting (45) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01230-LAK; granting (56) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01239-LAK; granting (50) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01944-LAK; granting (48) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01946-LAK; granting (37) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01943-LAK; granting (93) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-02363-LAK; granting (42) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03468-LAK; granting (42) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03467-LAK; granting (43) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03474-LAK; granting (43) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03475-LAK; granting (43) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03476-LAK; granting (39) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03478-LAK; granting (38) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03480-LAK; granting (20) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06041-LAK; granting (12) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06652-LAK; granting (13) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-06040-LAK; granting (16) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07877-LAK; granting (16) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07878-LAK; granting (20) Motion for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07900-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(db)
March 23, 2010 Filing 56 MOTION for Jordanna G. Thigpen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Zenith Insurance Co., Lou Solton, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 12 (Argument of Motions). The Court hereby fixes the following approximate time allocations for the argument on January 26, 2010 of the pending motions: Equity/Debt Case: Motion to dismiss Securities Act Claims: 1 hour. Motion to dismiss Exchange Act Claims: 40 minutes. ERISA Case: 40 minutes. Mortgage-Backed Securities Case: Rating agencies' motion to dismiss: 40 minutes. Individual defendants' motion to dismiss: 40 minutes. The Equity/Debt and ERISA motions will be heard beginning at 10 a.m. The Mortgage-Backed Securities motions will be heard beginning at 2:15 p.m. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/22/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
January 22, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION for Richard D. Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Ian Lowitt.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
December 23, 2009 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Elizabeth McGarry on behalf of Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, John D Macomber, John D. Macomber, Christopher Gent, Sir, Sir Christopher Gent, Michael L. Ainsle, John F Akers, Roland Hernandez Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(McGarry, Mary)
December 23, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph Chepiga on behalf of Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, Ronald A. Hernandez, John D Macomber, John D. Macomber, Ronald Hernandez, Christopher Gent, Sir, Sir Christopher Gent, Michael L. Ainsle, John F Akers, Roland Hernandez Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Chepiga, Michael)
December 23, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erika Hannelore Burk on behalf of Michael L. Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, John d. Macomber, Ronald A. Hernandez, John D Macomber, John D. Macomber, Ronald Hernandez, Christopher Gent, Sir, Sir Christopher Gent, Michael L. Ainsle, John F Akers, Roland Hernandez Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Burk, Erika)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. Accordingly, the Lead Plaintiffs' motions to modifY the PSLRA discovery stay [09MD2017, docket items 188 & 193; 08 Civ. 5523, docket item 179; 08 Civ. 6762, docket item 94] are denied. denying (179) Motion in case 1:08-cv-05523-LAK; denying (94) Motion in case 1:08-cv-06762-LAK; denying (188) Motion; denying (193) Motion in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/11/09). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
December 10, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Oral Argument set for 1/26/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 11 (Scheduling Order). Oral argument on the motions to dismiss will be held on Tuesday, January 26, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/10/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm) Modified on 12/17/2009 (rjm).
October 27, 2009 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (39 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 46 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 45 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 193 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 94 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK) MOTION Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Relief from the PSLRA Discovery Stay. Sasco Individual Defendants' And California Action Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Sasco Plaintiffs' and California Actions Plaintiffs' Joinder Motions to Modify the Discovery Stay. Document filed by Mark L. Zusy, Lana Franks, Edward Grieb, Kristine Smith, Richard McKinney, Samir Tabet, James J. Sullivan, Christopher M. O'Meara, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Ronald Hernandez, Marsha Johnson Evans, Joseph M. Gregory, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Ian Lowitt, David Goldfarb, John F Akers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Chepiga, Michael)
October 23, 2009 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (32 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 193 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) MOTION Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Relief from the PSLRA Discovery Stay.. Document filed by Zenith Insurance Co., The San Mateo County Investment Pool, Lou Solton, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Siddiqui, Imtiaz)
October 22, 2009 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (39 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 115 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 81 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 3 in 1:09-cv-07877-LAK, 110 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 31 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 36 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 3 in 1:09-cv-07878-LAK, 30 in 1:09-cv-03480-LAK, 31 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 9 in 1:09-cv-06041-LAK, 46 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 45 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 70 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 62 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 4 in 1:09-cv-06652-LAK, 6 in 1:09-cv-07900-LAK, 50 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 28 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 37 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 5 in 1:09-cv-06040-LAK, 37 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 58 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 35 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK, 58 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 193 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 94 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 29 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 183 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK, 37 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 37 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 35 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK, 38 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 71 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 39 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK) MOTION Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Relief from the PSLRA Discovery Stay.. Document filed by Boilermakers-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund(On Behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated), Local 302 and 612 - Int'l Union of Operating Engineers, B.C. Ziegler and Company, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers - Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund(on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Lometti, Christopher)
October 22, 2009 Filing 45 MOTION Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Relief from the PSLRA Discovery Stay. Document filed by Boilermakers-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund(On Behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated), Local 302 and 612 - Int'l Union of Operating Engineers, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers - Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund(on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Lometti, Christopher)
September 17, 2009 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Imtiaz A. Siddiqui on behalf of Zenith Insurance Co., The San Mateo County Investment Pool, Lou Solton, City of Auburn, City of Burbank, City of San Buenaventura, Contra Costa Water District, Vallejo Sanitation & Flood Control District Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Siddiqui, Imtiaz)
August 7, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Douglas Bunch on behalf of Boilermakers-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund(On Behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated), Local 302 and 612 - Int'l Union of Operating Engineers, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers - Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund, New Jersey Carpenters Health Fund(on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Bunch, Stephen)
June 24, 2009 Filing 42 MEMO ENDORSED in case 1:08-cv-05523-LAK; granting (149) Motion for Steven J. Toll to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/24/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
June 24, 2009 Filing 41 MEMO ENDORSED in case 1:08-cv-05523-LAK; granting (148) Motion for Avi S. Grabow to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/24/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
June 24, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (31 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK, 42 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 35 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 35 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 153 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 23 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 82 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 25 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 33 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 28 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 67 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 33 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 26 in 1:09-cv-03480-LAK, 58 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 66 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 54 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 33 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 34 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 28 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 28 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 111 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 54 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 31 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK, 105 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 26 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 46 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 26 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 41 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 33 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 164 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
June 24, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (27 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 43 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 33 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 67 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 29 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 34 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 24 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 29 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 26 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 59 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 55 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 34 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 154 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 42 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 55 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 106 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK, 29 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 83 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 27 in 1:09-cv-03480-LAK, 36 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 33 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 112 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 47 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 165 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK, 35 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 36 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 34 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 68 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 34 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 27 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
June 24, 2009 Filing 40 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Incapital Holdings LLC as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Incapital LLC.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Boyd, David)
June 23, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney David R. Boyd to RE-FILE Document (24 in 1:09-cv-03480-LAK, 26 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 40 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 30 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 52 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 33 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 151 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 26 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 31 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 31 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 32 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 39 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 23 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 30 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 31 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 24 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 26 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 56 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 44 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 24 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 31 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 21 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 29 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK, 33 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 29 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK) MOTION for Disclosure. Use the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(db)
June 23, 2009 Filing 39 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Disclosure Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendant Incapital LLC. Document filed by Incapital LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Boyd, David) Modified on 6/24/2009 (db).
May 27, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Lometti on behalf of Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers - Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust. New Address: Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, 150 East 52nd, 30th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10022, 212-838-7797. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Lometti, Christopher)
May 26, 2009 Filing 37 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kenneth Mark Rehns on behalf of Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers - Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust. New Address: Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, 150 East 52nd Street, 30th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10022, 212-838-7797. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Rehns, Kenneth)
May 21, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Daniel Brett Rehns on behalf of Lehman Brothers, Inc.. New Address: Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, 150 East 52nd Street, 30th Floor, New York, New York, US 10022, 212-838-7797. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Rehns, Daniel)
May 8, 2009 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Christopher Lometti in Support re: (15 in 1:09-cv-03480-LAK, 152 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK) MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers - Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - CMST Resume)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Rehns, Daniel)
May 8, 2009 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (50 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 20 in 1:09-cv-03474-LAK, 15 in 1:09-cv-03480-LAK, 59 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 94 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 123 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 72 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 34 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 20 in 1:09-cv-03476-LAK, 26 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 20 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 17 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 15 in 1:09-cv-03467-LAK, 103 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 38 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 46 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 33 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 23 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK, 25 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 46 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 27 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 25 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 152 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK, 21 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 58 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 15 in 1:09-cv-03468-LAK, 24 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 14 in 1:09-cv-03478-LAK, 25 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 27 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 20 in 1:09-cv-03475-LAK, 23 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK) MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC. Document filed by Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers - Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Rehns, Daniel)
May 8, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC. Document filed by Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers - Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Rehns, Daniel)
May 8, 2009 Filing 32 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Schoengold Sporn Laitman & Lometti, P.C., New Attorney: Christopher Lometti, Daniel Rehns, Joel Laitman, Address: Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC, 150 East 52nd Street, 30th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10022, 212-838-7797. Document filed by Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers - Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Rehns, Daniel)
May 5, 2009 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David R. Boyd on behalf of Incapital LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Boyd, David)
May 4, 2009 Filing 30 MEMO ENDORSED granting (146) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case for Consolidated Defendant Incapital. 1:08-cv-05523-LAK; granting (89) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-05598-LAK; granting (67) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-06762-LAK; granting (98) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-08225-LAK; granting (54) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09404-LAK; granting (53) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09578-LAK; granting (41) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-09793-LAK; granting (33) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10008-LAK; granting (45) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10058-LAK; granting (41) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10206-LAK; granting (22) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10686-LAK; granting (117) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-md-02017-LAK; granting (18) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01236-LAK; granting (20) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01231-LAK; granting (19) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01237-LAK; granting (20) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01232-LAK; granting (29) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01238-LAK; granting (18) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01240-LAK; granting (21) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01235-LAK; granting (20) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01230-LAK; granting (28) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01239-LAK; granting (22) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01944-LAK; granting (16) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01946-LAK; granting (12) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01943-LAK; granting (15) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-02363-LAK; granting (10) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03468-LAK; granting (10) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03467-LAK; granting (15) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03474-LAK; granting (14) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03475-LAK; granting (15) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03476-LAK; granting (9) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03478-LAK; granting (10) Motion for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-03480-LAK. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/1/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(jmi)
April 29, 2009 Filing 29 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jonathan Philip Krisbergh on behalf of Incapital LLC. New Address: Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP, 575 Lexington Avenue, 7th Floor, New York, New York, 10022, 212-446-2300. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Krisbergh, Jonathan)
April 28, 2009 Filing 28 MOTION for David R. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Incapital LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PRETRIAL ORDER NO.9: Certain plaintiffs move to modify Pretrial Order NO.1 to permit them and their counsel to pursue as class claims certain claims that they have with respect to bonds of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. ("Lehman"), that were issued before February 13, 2007, and to appoint J. Allen Carney to the Executive Committee in this proceeding. The movants' arguments are singularly unpersuasive. The motion [09 MD 2017 docket item 61] is denied in all respects, substantially for the reasons set forth in the memoranda submitted by Lead Plaintiffs and the individual defendants. I add only two points. First, movants' assertion that their claims with respect to bond offerings preceding February 13, 2007 "have, in effect, been abandoned" (Movants' mem. 1) would be true if, and only if, movants' counsel is conceding that they have abandoned those claims. As they of course concede no such thing, the assertion is flatly incorrect. Nothing in Pretrial Order No.1 forecloses prosecution of those claims. While I enjoy good rhetoric as much as the next person, what separates good from bad rhetoric often is a connection between words and reality that makes the words ring true. That connection is missing here. Second, there is no need at this point to deal with movants' contention that they need not have complied with the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act provisions relating to class actions because their cases were commenced in state courts. There will be sufficient reason to do so in the event they seek class certification with respect to their claims in relation to pre-February 13, 2007 bond offerings. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/24/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al. (jmi)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 8 (Motions to Remand). Plaintiffs' motions to remand [09 MD 2017 docket item 54, 09 Civ. 1238 docket item 9, 09 Civ. 1239 docket item 8, 09 Civ. 1944 docket item 2 as well as the motions to remand on the transferor courts' docket sheets in 09 Civ. 3474, 09 Civ. 3975 and 09 Civ. 3976] all are denied. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/22/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
April 22, 2009 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (9 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 76 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 43 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 61 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK, 2 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 114 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK, 12 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 44 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 31 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 13 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 12 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 31 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 5 in 1:09-cv-02363-LAK, 6 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 41 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 6 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 88 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 35 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 23 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 9 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 7 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK) MOTION to Approve Modify Pre-Trial Order No.1 to Permit Plaintiffs to Prosecute Abandoned Bond Claims.. Document filed by Madeline Dimodica, Madeline Dimodica. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certifications)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Jacobs, Roy)
April 20, 2009 Filing 24 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 54 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 9 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Remand.. Document filed by Zenith Insurance Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Molumphy, Mark)
April 17, 2009 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Philip Krisbergh on behalf of Incapital LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Krisbergh, Jonathan)
April 17, 2009 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs Memorandum in Response to Arkansas Plaintiffs Motion to Modify Pretrial Order No. 1; and Declaration of John A. Kehoe in Support thereof served on Robert W. Monfrini, American National. Service was made by First Class Mail. Document filed by Northern Ireland Local Governmental Officers Superannuation Committee, Operating Engineers Local 3 Trust Fund, Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, City of Edinburgh Council as Administering Authority of the Lothian Pension Fund, Government of Guam Retirement Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Kehoe, John)
April 16, 2009 Filing 20 DECLARATION of John A. Kehoe in Opposition re: (114 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK, 12 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 44 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 31 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 12 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 31 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 5 in 1:09-cv-02363-UA, 41 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 35 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 7 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK, 9 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 76 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 43 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 61 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK, 2 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 13 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 6 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 6 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 88 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 23 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 9 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK) MOTION to Approve Modify Pre-Trial Order No.1 to Permit Plaintiffs to Prosecute Abandoned Bond Claims.. Document filed by Operating Engineers Local 3 Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Kehoe, John)
April 16, 2009 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (9 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 76 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 43 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 61 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK, 2 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 114 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK, 12 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 44 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 31 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 13 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 12 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 31 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 5 in 1:09-cv-02363-UA, 6 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 41 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 6 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 88 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 35 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 23 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 9 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 7 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK) MOTION to Approve Modify Pre-Trial Order No.1 to Permit Plaintiffs to Prosecute Abandoned Bond Claims.. Document filed by Northern Ireland Local Governmental Officers Superannuation Committee, Alameda County Employees' Retirement Association, Government of Guam Retirement Fund, Operating Engineers Local 3 Trust Fund, City of Edinburgh Council as Administering Authority of the Lothian Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Kehoe, John)
April 13, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE that the following attorneys appear as counsel on behalf of American National Insurance Company, American National Life Insurance Company of Texas, Comprehensive Investment Services, Inc., and The Moody Foundation in American National Insurance Company v. Fuld, 09-CY-2363 (LAK) which has been consolidated for all pretrial purposes under the caption In re Lehman Brothers Securities and ERISA Litigation, 09-MD-2017 (LAK). by Eric Joseph Kirkpatrick, Roni Sunderman Mihaly, Janet LaRene Wells Rushing, Andrew J. Mytelka on behalf of A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., American National Life Insurance Company of Texas, American National Insurance Company, The Moody Foundation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(jmi)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE JOINDER IN MOTION TO REMAND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel, that Plaintiffs San Buenavenrura, Burbank and Auburn are deemed to have timely joined in the County Motion to Remand upon the effective date of their transfer in this Court, and the briefing schedule set by Pretrial Order No.5 shall remain the same. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/13/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 1:09-cv-01944-LAK(jmi)
April 13, 2009 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re: (2 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 54 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 9 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Remand. Defendant Ernst & Young LLP's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Joinder in the Individual Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Document filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Wine, Jamie)
April 13, 2009 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Mary Elizabeth McGarry in Opposition re: (2 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 54 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 9 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Remand.. Document filed by Christopher M. O'Meara, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Ronald Hernandez, Marsha Johnson Evans, Joseph M. Gregory, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman, Ian Lowitt, David Goldfarb, John F Akers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-J)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(McGarry, Mary)
April 13, 2009 Filing 15 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (2 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 54 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 9 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK) MOTION to Remand.. Document filed by Christopher M. O'Meara, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Erin Callan, Ronald Hernandez, Marsha Johnson Evans, Richard S. Fuld, Jr, Roland A. Hernandez, Ian Lowitt, Joseph M. Gregory, David Goldfarb, John F Akers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(McGarry, Mary)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7. By letter dated March 20, 2009, Mr. Trevor, counsel for plaintiffs in four actions removed from the California Superior Court and transferred to this Court, asks that he be appointed Liaison Counsel for the individual plaintiffs in the securities cases. That application is opposed by Mr. Molumphy, who points out the Mr. Trevor previously argued against the appointment of a single lawyer as Liaison Counsel for the individual plaintiffs and contends that if a single lawyer is to be appointed, it should be Mr. Molumphy. Neither Mr. Trevor nor Mr. Molumphy is likely to be reticent in advancing the interests of their own clients. Nor, I suspect, will the other counsel who represent plaintiffs who have brought their own actions. While it might well prove to be helpful if one or two lawyers would take the lead on behalf of the plaintiffs who have filed individual actions in presenting the views of such plaintiffs to Lead Counsel, I am confident that this will develop of its own accord. I therefore view the current contretemps as having more to do with titles that may be of use in other, unrelated litigations and other matters that are not of immediate concern. Accordingly, I decline these invitations. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/6/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
March 30, 2009 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (9 in 1:09-cv-01237-LAK, 76 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 43 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 61 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01236-LAK, 2 in 1:09-cv-01943-LAK, 114 in 1:08-cv-05523-LAK, 12 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01230-LAK, 44 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01231-LAK, 31 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 13 in 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 12 in 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 31 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 8 in 1:09-cv-01232-LAK, 5 in 1:09-cv-02363-UA, 6 in 1:09-cv-01946-LAK, 41 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 6 in 1:09-cv-01944-LAK, 88 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 35 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 23 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 9 in 1:09-cv-01235-LAK, 7 in 1:09-cv-01240-LAK) MOTION to Approve Modify Pre-Trial Order No.1 to Permit Plaintiffs to Prosecute Abandoned Bond Claims.. Document filed by Madeline Dimodica. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Jacobs, Roy)
March 30, 2009 Filing 12 MOTION to Approve Modify Pre-Trial Order No.1 to Permit Plaintiffs to Prosecute Abandoned Bond Claims. Document filed by Madeline Dimodica.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Jacobs, Roy)
March 27, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie Lynne Wine on behalf of Ernst & Young LLP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Wine, Jamie)
March 27, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miles Norman Ruthberg on behalf of Ernst & Young LLP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Ruthberg, Miles)
March 23, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand. Document filed by Zenith Insurance Co., The San Mateo County Investment Pool, Lou Solton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK, 1:09-cv-01944-LAK(Molumphy, Mark)
March 16, 2009 Filing 9 MDL TRANSFER IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and from the United States District Court - Northern District of California. Case Number: 3:08-cv-5353 (SC), MDL Number: 09-MD-2017, (mbe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2009: #1 Doc # 2, #2 Doc #3, #3 Doc #4, #4 Doc #5, #5 Doc #6, #6 Doc #7, #7 Doc #8, #8 Doc #9, #9 Doc #10, #10 Doc #11, #11 Doc #12, #12 Doc #13, #13 Doc #14, #14 Doc #15, #15 Doc #16, #16 Doc #17, #17 Doc #18, #18 Doc #19, #19 Doc #20, #20 Doc #21, #21 Doc #22, #22 Doc #23, #23 Doc #24, #24 Doc #25, #25 Doc #26, #26 Doc #27, #27 Doc #28, #29 Doc #29, #30 Doc #30, #31 Doc #31, #32 Doc #32, #33 Doc #33, #34 Doc #34, #35 Doc #35, #36 Doc #36, #37 Doc #37, #38 Doc #38, #41 Doc #39, #42 Doc #40, #43 Doc #41) (mbe).
March 16, 2009 Mailed letter to the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of their entire file, a certified copy of the transfer order and docket entries. (mbe)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5. The Court conducted a conference with counsel on March 2, 2009. The Court established the following schedules: 1. The movant(s) on each motion to remand that was or may be pending at the time of transfer in cases transferred to this Court on or before March 23, 2009 by that date shall inform the Court in writing whether the motion is withdrawn. Opposing papers on all remaining motions to remand shall be filed on or before April 13, 2009. Reply papers on all such motions shall be filed on or before April 20, 2009. 2. Motions to dismiss individual cases as distinguished from class actions are not to be filed until the disposition of motions to dismiss class actions. This Document Applies to: All Cases. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/5/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(rjm)
February 27, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of of Appearance of J. Allen Carney. Document filed by Madeline Dimodica. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Jacobs, Roy)
February 25, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Cotton Molumphy on behalf of Zenith Insurance Co., The San Mateo County Investment Pool Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 1:09-cv-01238-LAK, 1:09-cv-01239-LAK(Molumphy, Mark)
February 25, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roy Laurence Jacobs on behalf of Madeline Dimodica Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Jacobs, Roy)
February 24, 2009 Filing 3 BRIEF re: (15 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 15 in 1:08-cv-10008-LAK, 80 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 80 in 1:08-cv-08225-LAK, 36 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 36 in 1:08-cv-09404-LAK, 5 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 5 in 1:08-cv-10686-LAK, 62 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 62 in 1:08-cv-05598-LAK, 27 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 27 in 1:08-cv-10058-LAK, 26 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 26 in 1:08-cv-06762-LAK, 24 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 24 in 1:08-cv-10206-LAK, 35 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 35 in 1:08-cv-09578-LAK, 21 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 21 in 1:08-cv-09793-LAK, 6 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK, 6 in 1:09-md-02017-LAK) Order, Set Hearings,,,,,,,, Bonderholder Plaintiffs' Written Submission Pursuant to Pretrial Order No. 2 on behalf of Madeline Dimodica, Barbara Kattell, Henry Napierala, Linda Napierala, Michael Shipley and Guy S. Warden. Document filed by Madeline Dimodica.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Jacobs, Roy)
February 24, 2009 Filing 2 STATUS REPORT. City and County Plaintiffs' Status Conference Statement Document filed by Zenith Insurance Co., The San Mateo County Investment Pool.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02017-LAK et al.(Molumphy, Mark)
February 10, 2009 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring this action from the United States District Court - Northern District of California, Case Number: 3:08-cv-5353, MDL Number: 09MD2017, (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/9/2009) (mbe)
February 10, 2009 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (mbe)
February 10, 2009 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:09-md-02017-LAK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (mbe)
February 10, 2009 Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
February 10, 2009 Case Assignment Clerk mailed letter to the United States District Court - Northern District of California requesting their entire file and a certified copy of their docket entries. (mbe)
February 10, 2009 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:09-md-02017-LAK.. (mbe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The San Mateo County Investment Pool v. Fuld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Akers
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Represented By: Wayne I. Pollock
Represented By: Andrew J. Levander
Represented By: Michael Joseph Chepiga
Represented By: Adam Jay Wasserman
Represented By: Erika Hannelore Burk
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McGarry
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Callan
Represented By: Alfred Ulmer Pavlis
Represented By: Joshua Judah Pollack
Represented By: Richard Steven Gora
Represented By: Michael Quinn English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe General Corporate & Investment Banking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Gregory
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Represented By: Israel David
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daiwa Capital Markets Europe Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group, LLP
Represented By: Ranah Leila Esmaili
Represented By: David Andrew Crichlow, Sr
Represented By: Tameka Melissa Beckford-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ING Financial Markets
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortis Securities
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Securities Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin M. Callan
Represented By: Alfred Ulmer Pavlis
Represented By: Richard Steven Gora
Represented By: Michael Quinn English
Represented By: Seth David Fier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Goldfarb
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Represented By: Vincent Anthony Sama
Represented By: Catherine Barry Schumacher
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger S. Berlind
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Represented By: Wayne I. Pollock
Represented By: Andrew J. Levander
Represented By: Michael Joseph Chepiga
Represented By: Adam Jay Wasserman
Represented By: Erika Hannelore Burk
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McGarry
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellon Financial Markets, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Johnson Evans
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Represented By: Wayne I. Pollock
Represented By: Andrew J. Levander
Represented By: Adam Jay Wasserman
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernst & Young LLP
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Wine
Represented By: James Kevin Lynch
Represented By: Miles Norman Ruthberg
Represented By: Peter A. Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Lowitt
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Represented By: David Yury Livshiz
Represented By: Kelly Marie Hnatt
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Martin Joel Auerbach
Represented By: Lewis J. Liman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerzbank Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R. Beal & Co.
Represented By: Joseph Angelo Mendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Securities LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Fuld, Jr.
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Represented By: Patricia M. Hynes
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Kaufman
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Represented By: Wayne I. Pollock
Represented By: Andrew J. Levander
Represented By: Michael Joseph Chepiga
Represented By: Adam Jay Wasserman
Represented By: Erika Hannelore Burk
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McGarry
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. O'Meara
Represented By: Guy Petrillo
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Represented By: Joshua Klein
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland A. Hernandez
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Represented By: Wayne I. Pollock
Represented By: Andrew J. Levander
Represented By: Michael Joseph Chepiga
Represented By: Adam Jay Wasserman
Represented By: Erika Hannelore Burk
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McGarry
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Kathleen Fuld
Represented By: Patricia M. Hynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Trust Robinson Humphrey
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natexis Bleichroeder Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The San Mateo County Investment Pool
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Imtiaz A. Siddiqui
Represented By: Sean Eric Ponist
Represented By: Joseph Winters Cotchett
Represented By: Nanci E. Nishimura
Represented By: Matthew K. Edling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Dimodica
Represented By: Roy Laurence Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?