Haley v. Fanlo et al
Plaintiff: Paul B. Haley
Defendant: Tracy Collins, R. Glenn Hubbard, Jeffrey B. Van Horn, Scott C. Nuttall, Scott Ryles, Ely L. Licht, David A. Netjes, Ross J. Kari, Vincent Paul Finigan, Deborah H. Mcaneny, William C. Sonneborn, Saturnino S Fanlo, William F. Aldinger, Willy R. Strothotte and Paul M. Hazen
Undetermined: KKR Financial Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv02681
Filed: March 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Stockholders Suits Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: 1. all claims asserted herein by Plaintiff against Defendants shall be dismissed with prejudice as to this Plaintiff; and 2. all parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. 3. The clerk of Court shall close this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/4/2011) (lnl)
January 8, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Andrew Swick on behalf of Paul B. Haley. New Address: Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC, 500 5th Ave, Suite 1810, New York, New York, USA 10110, 212-696-3730. (Swick, Michael)
October 1, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Gerard E. Lynch is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS. The proceedings in this Action shall be stayed until the Charter Litigation is dismisses on the pleadings with prejudice or Defendants file an answer in the Charter Litigation. Nothing herein shall preclude Plaintiff from filing an amended complaint during the stay. Defendants shall be required to file a response (by motion, answer, or other pleading) to the operative complaint in this Action 60 days after the Charter Litigation is dismissed on the pleadings with prejudice or Defendants file an answer in the Charter Litigation. In the event that the Defendants provide or produce discovery to the plaintiff in the Charter Litigation during the pendency of the stay in this Action, the Defendants agree to provide such discovery to Plaintiff in this Action within 10 business days of its production in the Charter Litigation, provided that the parties have executed a protective order. Any party may seek Court permission to terminate the stay upon 10 days written notice to the other parties. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 6/18/09) (djc)
April 27, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of Firm Name Change. Document filed by Paul B. Haley. (Swick, Michael)
April 27, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE of Firm Name Change. Document filed by Paul B. Haley. (Myers, Albert)
April 2, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Gerard E. Lynch. (ama)
April 2, 2009 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:08-cv-07062-GEL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ama)
April 1, 2009 Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (ama)
March 23, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul M. Hazen, R. Glenn Hubbard, Ross J. Kari, William F. Aldinger, Scott C. Nuttall, Ely L. Licht, Deborah H. Mcaneny, Vincent Paul Finigan, Tracy Collins, Scott Ryles, Willy R. Strothotte, KKR Financial Holdings, LLC, Saturnino S Fanlo, David A. Netjes, William C. Sonneborn, Jeffrey B. Van Horn. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 682337)Document filed by Paul B. Haley.(rdz)
March 23, 2009 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul M. Hazen, R. Glenn Hubbard, Ross J. Kari, William F. Aldinger, Scott C. Nuttall, Ely L. Licht, Deborah H. Mcaneny, Vincent Paul Finigan, Tracy Collins, Scott Ryles, Willy R. Strothotte, KKR Financial Holdings, LLC, Saturnino S Fanlo, David A. Netjes, William C. Sonneborn, Jeffrey B. Van Horn. (rdz)
March 23, 2009 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
March 23, 2009 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gerald E. Lynch as possibly Related to 08-cv-7062. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haley v. Fanlo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Glenn Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey B. Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott C. Nuttall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ryles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ely L. Licht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Netjes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross J. Kari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Paul Finigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah H. Mcaneny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saturnino S Fanlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Aldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willy R. Strothotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Hazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KKR Financial Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul B. Haley
Represented By: Michael Andrew Swick
Represented By: Lewis Stephen Kahn
Represented By: Albert Morris Myers, III
Represented By: Kevin L. Oufnac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?