Gold et al v. New York Life Insurance CO. et al
Plaintiff: Avraham Gold
Defendant: New York Life Insurance CO., New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corp., NYLife Insurance Co. of Arizona, John Does 1-50 and ABC Corporations 1-50
Case Number: 1:2009cv03210
Filed: April 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. For the reasons set forth in this Order, Defendants New York Life Insurance Company, New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation, NYLIFE Secu rities LLC, and NYLIFE Insurance Company of Arizona's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is denied, and their motion requesting that this Court decline to exercise jurisdiction is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 26 and mark this case closed. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/14/2012) (tro)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/20/2009) (jpo)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall engage in an initial phase of discovery relevant to Plaintiffs individual claims. Said discovery shall not address issues relevant only to certification of a class action under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23. The follo wing schedule shall be in place unless otherwise amended by the Court following the status conference scheduled for September 22, 2009: The parties shall exchange their Rule 26 disclosures by August 16, 2009; The parties may serve all written discove ry requests relating to the initial phase off act discovery. The parties shall have sixty (60) days to respond to written discovery requests served before the status conference scheduled for September 22, 2009. The parties shall submit a joint letter by September 18, 2009 setting forth their respective positions as to the appropriate contours of discovery, including proposed limitations concerning the number and length of depositions and the subject matter of discovery. The initial phase of fact discovery shall be completed by January 15, 2010. A status conference will be held on September 22, 2009 at 3:30 p.m. at which the Court will address the scope of discovery going forward in this matter. No depositions shall take place prior to that conference. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/7/2009) (jpo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold et al v. New York Life Insurance CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avraham Gold
Represented By: Adam C. Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYLife Insurance Co. of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?