Natixis North America Inc. v. Cervalis LLC
Plaintiff: Natixis North America Inc.
Defendant: Cervalis LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv05457
Filed: June 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Richard J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201dj
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties need not submit the materials called for by the Court's 7/8/09 Order, and the previously scheduled 7/30/09 status conference is cancelled. This action is dismissed with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within thirty days of the date of this Order, any party may apply by letter for restoration of this action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/20/09) (tro)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on July 30, 2009 at 2:30 p,m. in Courtroom 21C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. That, by 4:00 p.m. on July 23, 2009 the parties shall jointly submit aletter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing, in separate paragraphs stating the information that is set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/8/09) (pl)
July 6, 2009 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Cervalis LLC. Document filed by Natixis North America Inc.(dle)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SEALING ORDER: The Complaint that is currently docketed as document number 1 shall be stricken from the public docket sheet in this matter. By 7/3/2009, Plaintiff shall file the proposed redacted Complaint and exhibits via ECF. The Clerk of the Court shall accept for filing under seal the complete and unedited version of Plaintiff's original Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion docketed as document number 3. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/30/2009) (jar)
July 2, 2009 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rt)
June 29, 2009 Filing 6 JOINDER to join /Stipulation of Consent to an Order to Seal Confidential Information. Document filed by Cervalis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Fishman, Eric)
June 29, 2009 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Boccardi in Support re: #3 CONSENT MOTION to Seal /Notice of Motion on Consent to Seal Confidential Information On An Expedited Basis.. Document filed by Cervalis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fishman, Eric)
June 29, 2009 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 CONSENT MOTION to Seal /Notice of Motion on Consent to Seal Confidential Information On An Expedited Basis.. Document filed by Cervalis LLC. (Fishman, Eric)
June 29, 2009 Filing 3 CONSENT MOTION to Seal /Notice of Motion on Consent to Seal Confidential Information On An Expedited Basis. Document filed by Cervalis LLC.(Fishman, Eric)
June 12, 2009 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Natixis S.A., Banque Federale des Banques Populaires and Caisse Nationale des Caisses d'Epargne et de Prevoyance as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natixis North America Inc.(mro) (ama).
June 12, 2009 Case Designated ECF. (mro)
June 12, 2009 Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (mro)
June 12, 2009 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cervalis LLC. (mro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natixis North America Inc. v. Cervalis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natixis North America Inc.
Represented By: Shirin Keen
Represented By: Howard Jeffrey Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cervalis LLC
Represented By: Eric Xinis Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?