U.S.A. Famous Original Ray's Licensing Corp. v. Tisi's Pizza and Pasta Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: U.S.A. Famous Original Ray's Licensing Corp.
Defendant: Tisi's Pizza and Pasta Inc., John Does "1" through "5" and XYZ Companies "A" through "C"
Case Number: 1:2009cv05517
Filed: June 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Queens
Presiding Judge: Richard M. Berman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2009 Filing 17 DEFAULT JUDGMENT # 09,2485 That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated December 22, 2009, the report is adopted in its entirety, and judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant for $78,000 in damages, $7,782 in attorney's fees, and $633.63 in costs, for a total of $86,415.63; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 12/31/09) (ml)
December 31, 2009 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 16 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (jfe)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: For the reasons set forth therein and herein, the Court adopts the Report in its entirety. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant for $78,000 in damages, $7,782 in attorney's fees, and $633.63 in costs, for a total of $86,415.63. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to close this case. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/31/2009) (jfe)
December 1, 2009 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Reason: 12/1/09 Report and Recommendation. (tro)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS For the reasons set forth above, the Court should award Ray's $78,000 in damages, $7,782 in attorneys fees and $633.63 costs, for a total of $86,415.63. Objections to R&R due by 12/18/2009. SO ORDERED (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 12/1/2009) (jmi)
November 2, 2009 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Agatha Mangano in Support re: 10 MOTION Monetary Damages and Attorney's Fees re: 9 Order, Set Deadlines,,. MOTION Monetary Damages and Attorney's Fees re: 9 Order, Set Deadlines,,. MOTION Monetary Damages and Attorney's Fees re: 9 Order, Set Deadlines,,.. Document filed by U.S.A. Famous Original Ray's Licensing Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(DeMaro, John)
November 2, 2009 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Jonathan C. Sullivan in Support re: 10 MOTION Monetary Damages and Attorney's Fees re: 9 Order, Set Deadlines,,. MOTION Monetary Damages and Attorney's Fees re: 9 Order, Set Deadlines,,. MOTION Monetary Damages and Attorney's Fees re: 9 Order, Set Deadlines,,.. Document filed by U.S.A. Famous Original Ray's Licensing Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeMaro, John)
June 16, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tisi's Pizza and Pasta Inc., John Does "1" through "5", XYZ Companies "A" through "C". (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 691095)Document filed by U.S.A. Famous Original Ray's Licensing Corp.(ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S.A. Famous Original Ray's Licensing Corp. v. Tisi's Pizza and Pasta Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S.A. Famous Original Ray's Licensing Corp.
Represented By: Jonathan Christopher Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tisi's Pizza and Pasta Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does "1" through "5"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies "A" through "C"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?