Malena et al v. Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fredda Malena
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Ann O'Malley and Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv05849
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Queens
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/19/2012) (djc)
September 24, 2012 Filing 99 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #96 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. (fk)
September 14, 2012 Filing 98 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Andrew C. Smith and Anthony Carabba dated 9/12/2012 re: The parties respectfully request that the Court postpone the scheduling conference of September 27 until after the mediation on October 16. ENDORSEMENT: The Sept. 27, 2012 conference is adjourned. The parties shall submit a joint letter on or before Oct. 19, 2012 regarding the status of mediation settlement efforts. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/14/2012) (jfe)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Conference set for 9/27/2012 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. The purpose of the conference is to schedule the trial and the filing of pretrial submissions in this matter. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/10/2012) (cd)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #76 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #82 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons set forth in this Order, Defendants motions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Specifically, the Corporate Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted as to the claims for aiding and abetting under the NYSHRL and NYCHRL and for violation of the NYSLL's spread-of-hours provision. The Corporate Defendants' motion is denied in all other respects. O'Malleys motion for summary judgment is granted as to the claims for FMLA retaliation, direct liability for discrimination under the NYSHRL, and violation of the NYSLL's spread-of-hours provision. O'Malleys motion is denied in all other respects. Plaintiffs withdrawn claims for failure to keep accurate records under the FLSA, failure to keep accurate records under the NYSLL, and failure to provide meal breaks under the NYSLL are dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at docket entry numbers 76 and 82. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/16/2012) (tro) Modified on 8/17/2012 (tro).
March 9, 2012 Filing 95 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Michael G. Long in Support re: #76 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Individual Discrimination and Retaliation Claims and Certain Wage-Hour Claims., #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann O'Malley on Plaintiff's Claims Against Her.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Amended Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories on Individual Claims)(Griffaton, Michael)
March 9, 2012 Filing 94 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #76 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Individual Discrimination and Retaliation Claims and Certain Wage-Hour Claims., #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann O'Malley on Plaintiff's Claims Against Her.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
February 24, 2012 Filing 93 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #87 Rule 56.1 Statement,. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself). (Carabba, Anthony)
February 24, 2012 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Anthony Carabba, Jr. in Opposition re: #76 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Individual Discrimination and Retaliation Claims and Certain Wage-Hour Claims., #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann O'Malley on Plaintiff's Claims Against Her.. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's affidavit, #2 Exhibit Pages from Plaintiff's deposition transcript, #3 Exhibit Pages from O'Malley transcript, #4 Exhibit Pages from Fallacaro transcript, #5 Exhibit Pages from Reyes transcript, #6 Exhibit Answer, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's background check, #8 Exhibit Job description, #9 Exhibit O'Malley note, #10 Exhibit O'Malley note 2, #11 Exhibit O'Maalley note 3, #12 Exhibit O'Malley note 4, #13 Exhibit O'Malley note 5, #14 Exhibit O'Malley note 6, #15 Exhibit O'Malley note 7, #16 Exhibit O'Malley note 8, #17 Exhibit O'Malley note 9, #18 Exhibit Impact Award, #19 Exhibit Award notes, #20 Exhibit Performance review, #21 Exhibit Malena notes, #22 Exhibit Clothing email, #23 Exhibit January 16 email, #24 Exhibit Replacement notes, #25 Exhibit Offer letter, #26 Exhibit Pay records (Pincus), #27 Exhibit Pay records (Malena), #28 Exhibit Interrogatory responses, #29 Exhibit Complaint, #30 Exhibit Verification, #31 Exhibit Fallacaro notes, #32 Exhibit EA pay range, #33 Exhibit Malena Affidavit, #34 Exhibit Conversation notes, #35 Exhibit FMLA approval, #36 Exhibit Fallacaro notes)(Carabba, Anthony)
February 24, 2012 Filing 91 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #81 Rule 56.1 Statement,. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself). (Carabba, Anthony)
February 24, 2012 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #76 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Individual Discrimination and Retaliation Claims and Certain Wage-Hour Claims., #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann O'Malley on Plaintiff's Claims Against Her.. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself). (Carabba, Anthony)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 AGREED ORDER: Accordingly, the Court decertifies this action as an FLSA collective action, dismisses the claims of the opt-in plaintiffs without prejudice, and grants equitable tolling of the statute of limitations as to their respective FLSA claims for a period of 60 days from the date of this Order. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/24/2012) (jfe)
February 17, 2012 Filing 88 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Anthony Carabba, Jr. dated 2/16/2012 re: Counsel for the Plaintiff writes to request an extension of time to their opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment until 2/24/2012 and Defendant's reply until 3/9/2012. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Responses due by 2/24/2012. Replies due by 3/9/2012.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/17/2012) (ab)
January 27, 2012 Filing 87 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT of Sheena Foley in Support re: #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann O'Malley on Plaintiff's Claims Against Her.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT of Pia Ferrario in Support re: #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann O'Malley on Plaintiff's Claims Against Her.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT of Michael C. Griffaton in Support re: #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann O'Malley on Plaintiff's Claims Against Her.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Malena Dep. Excerpts, #4 Exhibit O'Malley Dep. Excerpts, #5 Exhibit Fallacaro Dep. Excerpts)(Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann O'Malley on Plaintiff's Claims Against Her.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ann O'Malley on Plaintiff's Claims Against Her. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. Responses due by 2/17/2012(Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 81 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Sheena Foley in Support re: #76 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Individual Discrimination and Retaliation Claims and Certain Wage-Hour Claims.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT of Pia Ferrario in Support re: #76 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Individual Discrimination and Retaliation Claims and Certain Wage-Hour Claims.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Michael C. Griffaton in Support re: #76 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Individual Discrimination and Retaliation Claims and Certain Wage-Hour Claims.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Malena Dep. Excerpts, #4 Exhibit O'Malley Dep. Excerpts, #5 Exhibit Fallacaro Dep. Excerpts)(Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #76 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Individual Discrimination and Retaliation Claims and Certain Wage-Hour Claims.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
January 27, 2012 Filing 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Individual Discrimination and Retaliation Claims and Certain Wage-Hour Claims. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. Responses due by 2/17/2012(Griffaton, Michael)
December 15, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Status Conference held on 12/15/2011. Motions due by 1/27/2012. Replies due by 2/24/2012. Responses due by 2/17/2012. (See transcript). (rjm)
November 8, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (cd)
November 8, 2011 Minute Order Proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Status Conference held on 11/8/2011. Next PTC set for 12/15/11 @ 10 am. (cd)
October 17, 2011 Filing 75 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Michael G. Long dated 10/13/2011 re: Defendant requests a continuance and plaintiff does not object. Because of other previously scheduled matters, Defendants' counsel is not available on November 2. Both defendants' counsel and Plaintiff's counsel are available on any of the following November dates: 11/8/2011, 11/9/2011, 11/10/11, 11/15/2011, 11/16/2011, 11/29/2011, 11/30/2011. ENDORSEMENT: The status conference is hereby scheduled for November 8, 2011 at1:30 p.m. ( Status Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/14/2011) (js)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties in this case shall submit a joint letter to the Court updating the Court on the status of the case no later than October 19, 2011. The status letter should address the following subjects set forth within. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties appear on November 2, 2011, at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 15D, United States District Court, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007, for a status conference. Counsel should arrive prepared to fix dates for completion of discovery, for submission of a joint pretrial order, and for a final pretrial conference. ( Status Conference set for 11/2/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/7/2011) (jfe)
October 3, 2011 Filing 73 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge William H. Pauley, III is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
September 26, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/19/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 26, 2011 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/19/2011 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 20, 2011 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. I have closed the above reference for magistrate judge statistical purposes. Reason: Motion Resolved. (jab)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: The Court has reviewed defendants' letter of September 1, 2011 and plaintiffs' letter of September 6, 2011, and each side's draft of a Corrective Notice. The Court finds both plaintiffs' and defendants' proposals to be unsatisfactory, and has drafted it own Corrective Notice, taking parts of the parties' proposals as well as language from the original Notice. The Court's approved Corrective Notice is attached as Exhibit 1. The parties are to send the Corrective Notice to the currently employed Executive Assistants, in the same way the original notice as sent by September 16, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 9/7/2011) (rdz)
August 24, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/19/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 24, 2011 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/19/2011 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 19, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Status Conference held on 8/19/2011. Plaintiffs sanction motion is granted in part and denied in part - see transcript. Curative letter to current employer due 9/6. (ft)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #54 Motion for Sanctions. For the reasons stated at today's conference, plaintiff's motion for sanctions (Dkt. No. 54) is granted in part and denied in part. The parties shall provide their proposed "curative" letter to the current executive assistant to the Court by September 6, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 8/19/2011) (mro) Modified on 8/22/2011 (mro).
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Michael G. Long dated 8/2/2011 re: Counsel writes on behalf of both parties to request a new hearing date after August 15, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned at parties' request to 8/19 at 9:30 AM sharp (I have criminal Duty at 10 AM). So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 8/2/2011) Copies by ECF(js)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER, that the Court will have a conference/hearing regarding plaintiffs' sanctions motion on August 5, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. ( Status Conference set for 8/5/2011 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 8/1/11) Copies Faxed & ECF By Chambers. (pl)
July 29, 2011 Filing 64 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Anthony Carabba, Jr. in Support re: #54 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kinzer Letter 12.16.10, #2 Exhibit Deposition Page (N. Interlandi), #3 Exhibit Email exchange 12.22.10)(Carabba, Anthony)
July 29, 2011 Filing 63 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #54 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Carabba, Anthony)
July 22, 2011 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Douglas L. Williams in Opposition re: #54 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
July 22, 2011 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Michael G. Long in Opposition re: #54 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
July 22, 2011 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #54 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Griffaton, Michael)
July 22, 2011 Filing 59 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #54 MOTION for Sanctions. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael G. Long, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Douglas L. Williams)(Griffaton, Michael) Modified on 7/22/2011 (ldi).
July 22, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Michael C. Griffaton to RE-FILE Document #59 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. ERROR(S): Supporting/Opposing documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Opposition to Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
July 5, 2011 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Anthony Carabba, Jr. in Support re: #54 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Certification Order, #3 Exhibit Court Order re: Lawyer Letter, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Opposition Letter, #5 Exhibit Douglas L. Williams Email, #6 Exhibit Witness Declarations, #7 Exhibit Douglas L. Williams Deposition Pages)(Carabba, Anthony)
July 5, 2011 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #54 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Carabba, Anthony)
July 1, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Anthony Carabba to RE-FILE Document #56 MOTION for Sanctions Declaration of Anthony Carabba, Jr. in Support. Use the event type Declaration in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. NOTE: Re-File and link to document #54 Motion ONLY. (ldi)
July 1, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Anthony Carabba to RE-FILE Document #55 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. NOTE: Re-File and link to document #54 Motion ONLY. (ldi)
July 1, 2011 Filing 56 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Sanctions Declaration of Anthony Carabba, Jr. in Support. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Certification Order, #3 Exhibit Letter Application, #4 Exhibit Letter Opposition, #5 Exhibit Jan. 3, 2011 email, #6 Exhibit Declarations, #7 Exhibit Deposition Pages)(Carabba, Anthony) Modified on 7/5/2011 (ldi).
July 1, 2011 Filing 55 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Carabba, Anthony) Modified on 7/5/2011 (ldi).
July 1, 2011 Filing 54 MOTION for Sanctions. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). Return Date set for 7/29/2011 at 10:00 AM.(Carabba, Anthony)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Particular Motion: Plaintiff's motion for Sanctions to be filed on July 1, 2011. The Magistrate shall prepare a report and recommendation. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/15/11) Copies Sent By Chambers. (laq)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties having appeared for a pre-motion conference on June 3, 2011, the following schedule is entered on consent: Plaintiffs shall file their motion for sanctions by July 1, 2011. Defendants shall file their opposition by July 22, 2011. Plaintiffs shall file any reply by July 29, 2011. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/15/2011) (jfe)
May 24, 2011 Filing 51 Letter addressed to Judge William H. Pauley III from Michael G. Long dated 5/12/2011 re: We represent Defendants in the above action and respond to Plaintiff's May 6, 2011, letter requesting a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC.(mbe)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Anthony Carabba, Jr. dated 5/6/11 re: On Plaintiff's behalf we respectfully request a pre-motion conference to address Defendants' conduct that we believe violated a prior Court Order and interfered with the potential opt-in plaintiffs in this FLSA collective action/potential class action. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. A pre-motion conference will be held on June 3, 2011 at 1:45 p.m. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 6/3/2011 at 01:45 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/20/11) (rjm)
January 31, 2011 Filing 49 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Carabba, Anthony)
January 31, 2011 Filing 48 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Carabba, Anthony)
December 14, 2010 Filing 47 Letter addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Anthony Carabba dated 12/10/10 re: Response to Defendants' application for the Court to approve the dissemination of a "lawyer letter" to the potential members of the recently-certified collective action. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself).(db)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Michael G. Long dated 12/6/10 re: The parties have agreed upon the enclosed Notice of Lawsuit with Opportunity to Join (TAB A) and Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (TAB B) and submit the enclosed for the Court's consideration and approval. Defendants also submit a notice for the Court's approval that they wish to send before the Notice of Lawsuit with Opportunity to Join is sent (TAB C). ENDORSEMENT: Application is Granted in part and Denied in part. The parties proposed Notice and Consent, at Tabs A and B, are approved. The seperate Notice Defendant's propose, at Tab C, is denied as duplicative. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/14/10) (db)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Counsel for the parties having appeared for a telephone conference on November 18, 2010, Defendants' application for a Rule 35 examination of Plaintiff is denied without prejudice. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/18/10) Copies Sent By Chambers. (db)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #24 Motion to Certify Class; denying #27 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment dismissing the FLSA and the New York State Labor Law claims is denied, and Plaintiffs motion for collective action certification is granted in part and denied in part. The parties are directed to submit a proposed notice for approval by the Court no later than December 7, 2010. If the parties cannot agree on a form of notice, they shall submit letter memoranda by December 7, 2010. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/16/2010) (jar)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Anthony Carraba dated 10/18/2010 re: Counsel for defendant requests a pre-motion conference concerning defendants' anticipated motion for plaintiff to submit to a mental (psychological) examination under Fed.R. Civ. P. 35. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a conference on November 18, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. The parties may appear telephonically. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/15/2010) (js)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that the parties having appeared for a telephone conference on 5/27/10, the Defendant's Rule 45 subpoena duces tecum addressed to GlobalHue, dated 5/4/10, is quashed for the reasons set forth on the record. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/28/10) (cd)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER No. 2: Telephone Conference set for 5/27/2010 at 05:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/25/10) (cd)
April 14, 2010 Filing 40 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #24 MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Collective Action Certification). MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Collective Action Certification).. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself). (Carabba, Anthony)
April 14, 2010 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Michael G. Long in Opposition re: #37 Response to Motion,. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Long, Michael)
April 14, 2010 Filing 38 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Individual and Collective Action Claims and New York State Law Class Action Claims.. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.. (Long, Michael)
April 7, 2010 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re: #27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Individual and Collective Action Claims and New York State Law Class Action Claims. Plaintiff's Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself). (Carabba, Anthony)
April 7, 2010 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Anthony Carabba, Jr. in Opposition re: #27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Individual and Collective Action Claims and New York State Law Class Action Claims.. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Carabba, Anthony)
April 7, 2010 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Individual and Collective Action Claims and New York State Law Class Action Claims.. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself). (Carabba, Anthony)
April 7, 2010 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Michael C. Griffaton in Support re: #33 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,,. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-G, #3 Exhibit H-L, #4 Exhibit M-R, #5 Exhibit S-W)(Long, Michael)
April 7, 2010 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #24 MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Collective Action Certification). MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Collective Action Certification).. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.. (Long, Michael)
April 5, 2010 Filing 32 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Jeffrey Schulman dated 3/25/2010 re: Counsel requests that the Court remove him as counsel of record for Plaintiff. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. Attorney Jeffrey I. Schulman terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/5/2010) (tro)
March 25, 2010 Filing 31 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Michael G. Long dated 3/18/2010 re: Counsel for Defendants propose that the Court re-set the discovery deadline from 5/4/2010 to sixty days subsequent to the Court's decision on the two pending motions, or in the alternative, to sixty days subsequent to any opt in period in the event plaintiff's motion is granted. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/25/2010) (tro)
March 17, 2010 Filing 30 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.. (Long, Michael)
March 17, 2010 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Michael C. Griffaton in Support re: #27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Individual and Collective Action Claims and New York State Law Class Action Claims.. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A of Declaration of Michael C. Griffaton, #2 Exhibit 1 of Declaration of Douglas L. Williams, #3 Exhibit 2 of Williams Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 of Williams Declaration, #5 Exhibit B-G of Griffaton Declaration, #6 Exhibit H-L of Griffaton Declaration, #7 Exhibit M-R of Griffaton Declaration, #8 Exhibit S-W of Griffaton Declaration, #9 Exhibit X of Griffaton Declaration)(Long, Michael)
March 17, 2010 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Individual and Collective Action Claims and New York State Law Class Action Claims.. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.. (Long, Michael)
March 17, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Individual and Collective Action Claims and New York State Law Class Action Claims. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.. Responses due by 4/7/2010 Return Date set for 4/23/2010 at 10:30 AM.(Long, Michael)
March 17, 2010 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #24 MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Collective Action Certification). MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Collective Action Certification).. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Schulman, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2010 Filing 25 AFFIRMATION of Anthony Carabba, Jr. in Support re: #24 MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Collective Action Certification). MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Collective Action Certification).. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Schulman, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION to Certify Class (Preliminary Collective Action Certification). Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). Responses due by 4/7/2010 Return Date set for 4/23/2010 at 10:30 AM.(Schulman, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2010 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Individual and Collective Action Claims and New York State Law Class Action Claims. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.. Responses due by 4/7/2010(Long, Michael) Modified on 3/17/2010 (sn).
March 17, 2010 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Individual and Collective Action Claims and New York State Law Class Action Claims. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.. (Long, Michael) Modified on 3/17/2010 (sn).
March 17, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Michael G. Long to RE-FILE Document #22 Notice (Other). Use the relief type Partial Summary Judgment found under the event list Motions. (sn)
March 17, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Michael G. Long to RE-FILE Document #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Individual and Collective Action Claims and New York State Law Class Action Claims. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (sn)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 2: The plaintiff shall file her motion for preliminary certification as a collective action, and defendants shall file their motion for partial summary judgment on 3/17/10. The parties shall file oppositions by 4/7/10. The parties shall file any replies by 4/14/10. Oral Argument set for 4/23/2010 at 10:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/12/10) (dle)
March 2, 2010 Filing 20 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley III from Anthony Carabba, Jr., dated 2/16/10 re: counsel to plaintiff writes on behalf of all sides to respectfully request that the Court waive its requirement that Plaintiff's lead trial counsel attend the pre-motion conference scheduled for March 5, 2010; that the Court permit lead defense counsel, who is located in Ohio, to appear at that conference via telephone; and that the deadline to complete discovery be extended for sixty days. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. The Court will hold a telephone conference on March 12, 2010 at 2:30 p.m., before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/2/10) (djc)
February 9, 2010 Filing 19 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Jeffrey Schulman dated 1/19/2010 re: Counsel for Plaintiff request a pre-motion conference for Plaintiff's anticipated motion for preliminary certification as a collective action pursuant to 216(b) of the FLSA. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on March 5, 2010 at 9:45 a.m. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/9/2010) (tro)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/16/2009. Fact Discovery due by 3/5/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2010 at 02:15 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/16/2010. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/25/09) Copies sent by chambers.(cd)
September 10, 2009 Filing 17 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Schulman, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #14 Motion for Michael G. Long, Allen S. Kinzer and Michael C. Griffaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/27/2009) (tve)
August 28, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tve)
August 24, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joel Aaronson on behalf of Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc. (Aaronson, Matthew)
August 19, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $75.00, paid on 08/18/2009, Receipt Number 697601. (jd)
August 18, 2009 Filing 14 MOTION for Michael G. Long, Allen S. Kinzer and Michael C. Griffaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.(mro)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley III from Anthony Carabba, Jr dated 7/22/2009 re: Counsel respectfully request a brief adjournment of the initial pretrial conference which is currently scheduled for September 11, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The initial pre-trial conference is adjourned to September 25, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/4/2009) (jfe)
July 22, 2009 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc..(Harmon, Stephen)
July 22, 2009 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Limited Brands, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc..(Harmon, Stephen)
July 20, 2009 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Marle Campbell. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Schulman, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2009 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Brad Purnell. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Schulman, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2009 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Schulman, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2009 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Schulman, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2009 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Schulman, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2009 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Schulman, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2009 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Schulman, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2009 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Schulman, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/11/2009 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/10/09) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
June 25, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 692675)Document filed by Fredda Malena(on behalf of herself), Fredda Malena(on behalf of all others similarly situated).(mro)
June 25, 2009 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc., Ann O'Malley, Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc. (mro)
June 25, 2009 Case Designated ECF. (mro)
June 25, 2009 Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (mro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malena et al v. Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredda Malena
Represented By: Anthony Carabba, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Direct New York, LLC
Represented By: Allen Shawn Kinzer
Represented By: Michael G. Long
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson
Represented By: Michael C. Griffaton
Represented By: Stephen F. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Direct Media, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Shawn Kinzer
Represented By: Michael G. Long
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson
Represented By: Michael C. Griffaton
Represented By: Stephen F. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limited Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Shawn Kinzer
Represented By: Michael G. Long
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson
Represented By: Michael C. Griffaton
Represented By: Stephen F. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Direct, LLC
Represented By: Allen Shawn Kinzer
Represented By: Michael G. Long
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson
Represented By: Michael C. Griffaton
Represented By: Stephen F. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limited Brands Direct Media Production, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Shawn Kinzer
Represented By: Michael G. Long
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson
Represented By: Michael C. Griffaton
Represented By: Stephen F. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Shawn Kinzer
Represented By: Michael G. Long
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson
Represented By: Michael C. Griffaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann O'Malley
Represented By: Allen Shawn Kinzer
Represented By: Michael G. Long
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson
Represented By: Michael C. Griffaton
Represented By: Stephen F. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC
Represented By: Allen Shawn Kinzer
Represented By: Michael G. Long
Represented By: Matthew Joel Aaronson
Represented By: Michael C. Griffaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?