Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America v. Royal Food Distributors Limited Liability Company
Plaintiff: Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
Defendant: Royal Food Distributors Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv06418
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED ORDER FOR THE RELEASE OF PLAINTIFF'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BOND, plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Bond in the amount of $1,000 be released by the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to draw his check in the amount of $1,000, payable to Plaintiff's Attorneys, Bingham McCutchen, LLP. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/23/09) (cd)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant Royal Food Distributors Limited Liability Company is liable to plaintiff Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, and the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgme nt, in the total amount of $356,198.02, representing statutory damages of $300,000 and attorneys' fees and costs of $56,189.02. The Clerk of Court is directed to withdraw any pending motions and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/19/2009) (jpo)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/19/2009 at 01:00 PM before Judge Victor Marrero. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/3/2009) (jpo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America v. Royal Food Distributors Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
Represented By: Daniel F. Mitry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Food Distributors Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?