Wu v. Pearson Education Inc.
Plaintiff: Norbert Wu
Defendant: Pearson Education Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv06557
Filed: July 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Holwell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: With respect to settlement-related discovery, Pearson shall produce within one week of the date of this order: 1. Any document reflecting punitive fees or penalties that Pearson has paid to resolve print overrun claims; 2. Any d ocument reflecting final settlement of claims concerning print overruns; 3. Documents sufficient to show the date on which any claim concerning a print overrun was initiated; and 4. Any specific document previously requested by plaintiff that may hav e been withheld because it was created in the context of settlement negotiations. These documents shall be produced, as appropriate, pursuant to the confidentiality order in place in this case. In all other respects, the plaintiff's application to compel production of settlement-related discovery is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/12/2012) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (lmb)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM ORDER AND OPINION. For the foregoing reasons, Pearson's motion for reconsideration [09 Civ. 6557, 91] is DENIED. Wu's motion for class certification with respect to the Wu I action [09 Civ. 6557, 103] is GRANTED with the modifica tions noted above. Wu's motion for class certification with respect to the Wu II action [10 Civ. 6537, 17] is DENIED. Pearson's motion to dismiss the Wu II [10 Civ. 6537, 11] action is WITHDRAWN. With regards to the Wu II, Wu may conduct ad ditional class discovery of the defendant and of third party witnesses to determine whether the defects described in this opinion can be cured. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery schedule and submit the schedul e to the Court within fourteen days of the date of this order. Re: (103 in 1:09-cv-06557-RJH-JCF) MOTION to Certify Class filed by Norbert Wu, (91 in 1:09-cv-06557-RJH-JCF) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (71) Memorandum & Opinion filed by Pearson Education Inc., (17 in 1:10-cv-06537-RJH) MOTION to Certify Class filed by Norbert Wu, (11 in 1:10-cv-06537-RJH) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pearson Education Inc. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/30/11) (rjm)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 108 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief, filed by Norbert Wu: For the reasons set forth on this Memorandum and Order, the plaintiff's motion is denied in all respects. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/7/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ab)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Portions of the Amended Complaint, filed by Pearson Education Inc. Defendant's motion to dismiss (23) is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant's motion to sta y all state law claims arising from the Minden and Arnold agreements pending arbitration is GRANTED. Defendant's motion to stay the remaining claims is DENIED. Defendant's motion to strike is DENIED as moot. Defendant's motion to dismi ss copyright claims stemming from the Arnold agreement is GRANTED. Defendant's motion to dismiss all other copyright claims is DENIED. Defendant's motion to dismiss Counts II-IX of the complaint as they pertain to the AA photograph is DENIED without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/29/10) (cd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. Pearson Education Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norbert Wu
Represented By: Danial A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearson Education Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?