Gucci America, Inc. v. Frontline Processing Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Gucci America, Inc.
Defendant: Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC, ABC Companies and John Does
Case Number: 1:2009cv06925
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Harold Baer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FRCP 42(A)(2) that all claims asserted by Gucci against Frontline are dismissed with prejudice, and as further set forth in this document. The Clerk is instructed to remove this lawsuit from my docket. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/1/10) (cd)
October 1, 2010 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 89 Stipulation of Dismissal. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (pl)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CONSENT JUDGMENT, PERMANENT INJUNCTION, AND ORDER in favor of Gucci America, Inc. against Durango Merchant Services LLC, and Woodforest National Bank. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/1/10) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 42(a)(2): NOW, THEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: All claims asserted by Gucci against Frontline are dismissed with prejudice. Each of the Parties shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorney' fees associated with the prosecution and defense of this action. This Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter for purposes of enforcement of the terms of the parties' confidential settlement agreement, which are incorporated herein by reference. All unresolved pending motions in this action between Gucci and Frontline shall be denied as moot and the Clerk is instructed to remove this lawsuit from my docket. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/1/2010) (jfe)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER that all issues in this action having been resolved between the parties, this case is DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close this case and remove it from my docket. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 8/18/10) (cd)
August 17, 2010 Filing 86 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(cb)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DECLARATION of Seth Leone re: 47 Order,,,,,,. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Weigel, Robert)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DECLARATION of Anne M. Coyle in Support re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 76)(Weigel, Robert)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DECLARATION of Todd Wengrovsky in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Wengrovsky, Todd)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Shane Kairalla in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank. (Mentlik, William)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DECLARATION of Rhonda Lemos (with exhibits) in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank. (Mentlik, William)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DECLARATION of Charles Fillinger (with exhibit) in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank. (Mentlik, William)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECLARATION of Charles A. Vernon (with exhibits) in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank. (Mentlik, William)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECLARATION of Stan Paur in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank. (Mentlik, William)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DECLARATION of Charles P. Kennedy, Esq. in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - U)(Mentlik, William)
August 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mentlik, William)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statutory Damages Claim.. Document filed by Durango Merchant Services LLC, Woodforest National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mentlik, William)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECLARATION of Anne M. Coyle in Support re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1.1, # 2 Exhibit 1.2, # 3 Exhibit 2.1, # 4 Exhibit 2.2, # 5 Exhibit 2.3, # 6 Exhibit 3-14, # 7 Exhibit 15, # 8 Exhibit 16, # 9 Exhibit 17-18, # 10 Exhibit 19-20, # 11 Exhibit 21-25, # 12 Exhibit 26, # 13 Exhibit 27-61, # 14 Exhibit 62-65, # 15 Exhibit 66, # 16 Exhibit 67-75)(Weigel, Robert)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. Responses due by 8/2/2010(Weigel, Robert)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregg Adam Paradise on behalf of Woodforest National Bank (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Paradise, Gregg)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DECLARATION of Jennifer C. Halter in Opposition re: 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statutory Damages Claim.. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Part1, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Part 3, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13)(Weigel, Robert)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 56 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statutory Damages Claim.. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Robert Weigel dated 7/16/10 re: Counsel does not think that this Court should reconsider its decision and we do not think this Court needs to get involved in the details of a briefing schedule. The parties should be able to meet and confer and work this out. ENDORSEMENT: Motion by 7/23 at noon at the latest. August 1st for any answering papers for any motion, and the third (8/3) for any reply. You are the first group of lawyers to be unable to do this without court intervention. ( Motions due by 7/23/2010, Replies due by 8/3/2010, Responses due by 8/1/2010); (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 7/19/10); (djc)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from William L. Mentlik dated 7/16/10 re: On behalf of my client, defendant Woodforest National Bank ("Woodforest"). I am writing to request that Your Honor reconsider your decision, communicated to us yesterday by Mr. Heeren, to permit plaintiff Gucci America Inc. ("Gucci") to file a motion for summary judgment, with all briefing on that motion to be completed by August 1, 2010, according to a schedule to be worked out between the parties. ENDORSEMENT: The timetable remains the same. You will however be able to present any new and hopefully cataclysmic thoughts at oral argument should you choose to do so and you set it up with my clerk and then everyone will have been in accord with the tenor of the Federal Rules which provides that cases be tried on their merits. Just for your information, I'm "out of town" NOW! (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 7/16/10) (rjm)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Robert Weigel dated 7/14/2010 re: Defendants did not file their Answers to until July 7, 2010 and Plaintiff s cross-motion in response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment would not be due until July 26, 2010 in any event, but out of an abundance of caution, Plaintiff wanted to seek the Court's permission to file its motion on that date. ENDORSEMENT: August 1 for both Plaintiff and Defendant's fully-briefed motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 7/15/2010) (jmi)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr from William L. Mentlik dated 7/14/2010 re: Counsel respectfully request that Your Honor approve the following briefing schedule as agreed upon between counsel: Gucci's opposition by 7/26/2010, reply by 8/6/2010. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 7/14/2010) (jfe)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Mentlik, William)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECLARATION of Charles P. Kennedy, Esq. in Support re: 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statutory Damages Claim.. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Mentlik, William)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on June 30, 2010 before Judge Harold Baer. (mro)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Durango Merchant Services LLC.(Wengrovsky, Todd)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 55 ) - DECLARATION of Charles P. Kennedy, Esq. in Support re: 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statutory Damages Claim.. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Mentlik, William) Modified on 7/8/2010 (kkc).
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATED DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 50 ) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statutory Damages Claim.. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Mentlik, William) Modified on 7/8/2010 (kkc).
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU FOR RULE 56.1 STATEMENT (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 56 ) - MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statutory Damages Claim. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Mentlik, William) Modified on 7/8/2010 (kkc).
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statutory Damages Claim.. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Mentlik, William)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Statutory Damages Claim. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Mentlik, William)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mentlik, William)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Presently before this court is a motion by plaintiff Gucci America, Inc. ("Plaintiff' or "Gucci") to sanction defendant Durango Merchant Services LLC ("Defendant" or "Durango") as a consequence of allegations charging spoliation of evidence; Based on the above, I must conclude that Durango's destroyed potentially relevant documents in violation of its duty to preserve, and as such, it is hereby ORDERED, that Durango shall not run any further "file-scrubbing"-type software on any computers that may contain documents or data relevant to this litigation, nor otherwise delete or destroy documents that could be relevant to this litigation; and it is further, ORDERED, that Durango allow Gucci to have a forensic expert "image" the hard drives of computers owned by William Dimopolis and Nathan Counley, and provide the imaged drives to Plaintiff. Durango shall pay the costs for the imaging and reconstruction process. The parties are instructed to confer and establish a proper method to exclude privileged documents (i.e. a privilege log) in this process or before the imaged drives are turned over to Gucci. If Gucci believes it needs to image any other computer hard drives controlled by Durango, it will file a letter brief with this court that explains why it seeks to do so; and it is further, ORDERED, that should new information come to light or if Plaintiff feel that further sanctions are necessary, it will make this request in its dispositive motion papers, should any be filed. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 7/2/10) (ae)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECLARATION of Jennifer C. Halter in Support re: 45 Memorandum of Law in Support. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29)(Weigel, Robert)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Plaintiff Gucci America, Inc.'s Request for an Order Imposing Sanctions on Defendant Durango Merchant Services, LLC. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Michelle Lindsay on behalf of Gucci America, Inc. (Lindsay, Kimberly)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Todd Wengrovsky dated 6/25/2010 re: We write to inform the Court that Durango and Gucci have settled their dispute with regard to whether Gucci would have access to the hard drives of Durango's computers for inspection. ENDORSEMENT: Appears that the two of you are seeing the world differently and we best go forward unless you have made more progress. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 6/29/2010) (jpo)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION AND ORDER: #99094 For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 6/23/2010) (jfe) Modified on 6/25/2010 (ajc).
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Depositions due by 7/2/10. Summary Judgment and Other Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2010. Responses due by 7/16/2010. Replies due by 7/23/2010. Expert Depositions due by 8/27/2010. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2010. SO ORDERED. On Consent. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 6/7/10) (db)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on March 3, 2010 10:15 a.m. before Judge Harold Baer. (ajc)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... ENDORSEMENT: Sealed and "Confidential" documents may be opened upon notice to the parties pursuant to further order of the Court. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 3/17/2010) (js) Modified on 4/6/2010 (js).
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Herbert I. Pierce, III dated 2/19/2010 re: Frontline respectfully requests that the court hold in abeyance its Motion for Discovery Protective Order and Informal Discovery Conference. ENDORSEMENT: I will keep motions open for two weeks and dismiss it from my docket at that time unless you are prepared to proceed. I really don't need any more open motions on my docket again- March 10 you will be able to renew thereafter but I hope you work it out- without a dismissal but because its withdrawn. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 2/24/2010) (tro)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 34 FIRST MOTION for Discovery Protective Order and Informal Discovery Conference. Corrected Version of Response filed as Document No. 36. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Halter, Jennifer)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 34 FIRST MOTION for Discovery Protective Order and Informal Discovery Conference.. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Halter, Jennifer)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 FIRST MOTION for Discovery Protective Order and Informal Discovery Conference.. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -Gucci's 1st Requests for Production to Frontline, # 2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Trenton Hooper, Esq.)(Pierce, Herbert)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FIRST MOTION for Discovery Protective Order and Informal Discovery Conference. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation.(Pierce, Herbert)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT (EXHIBITS NOT FILED VIA ECF) - DECLARATION of Charles A. Vernon (Exhibit A) in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2). Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Paradise, Gregg) Modified on 11/24/2009 (db).
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Kittler in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims., 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Kennedy, Charles)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION of Charles A. Vernon in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims., 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Kennedy, Charles)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims., 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kennedy, Charles)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECLARATION of Anne M. Coyle in Opposition re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims., 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Weigel, Robert)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Jennifer Kirk in Opposition re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims., 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Weigel, Robert)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims., 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Maureen Coyle on behalf of Gucci America, Inc. (Coyle, Anne)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 25 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jmi)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 12 Motion for William L. Mentlik to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Woodforest National Bank. ENDORSEMENT: Application for Pro Hac Vice GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to close this motion. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/30/2009) (jmi)
October 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Wengrovsky on behalf of Durango Merchant Services LLC (Wengrovsky, Todd)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Lane, Stanley)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Shane Kairalla in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Lane, Stanley)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Charles A. Vernon in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank. (Lane, Stanley)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Kittler in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2).. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation. (Lane, Stanley)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Named Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2). Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC.(Lane, Stanley)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims.. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Kennedy, Charles)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Kennedy, Charles)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Durango Merchant Services LLC.(Kennedy, Charles)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Woodforest Financial Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank.(Kennedy, Charles)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation.(Kennedy, Charles)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from William L. Mentlik dated 10/29/09 re: Counsel for Woodforest National Bank and Woodforest's co-defendants, Frontline Processing Corporation and Durango Merchant Services, LLC, respectfully submit that good cause has been shown for the filing of separate motions to dismiss and ask for the Court's favorable disposition of their request for leave as set forth herein. ENDORSEMENT: Your call as to whether you submit 1 or 2 briefs but the page limit will not be extended- 35 pages max. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/29/09) (tro)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/22/2009, Receipt Number 704171. (jd)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 11 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jpo)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT HERBERT I. PIERCE, III, ESQ., JEFFERY J. OVEN ESQ., CHRISTOPHER C. STONEBECK, ESQ. AND G. TRENTON HOOPER, ESQ. granting 9 Motion for Herbert I. Pierce, III, Jefferey J. Oven, Christopher C. Stonebeck and G. Trenton Hooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/26/2009) (jpo)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for William L. Mentlik to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Woodforest National Bank.(mro)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties do not consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and F.R.C.P. 73. This case is not to be tried to a jury and the estimated number of trial days is 5. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2010. Discovery due by 6/15/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2010. Motions due by 7/15/2010. Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2010. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/22/2009) (jpo)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $100.00, paid on 10/16/2009, Receipt Number 702966. (jd)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Woodforest National Bank waiver sent on 8/5/2009, answer due 10/30/2009. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Herbert I. Pierve, III, Jeffrey J. Oven, Christopher C. Stoneback and G. Trenton Hooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Frontline Processing Corporation.(mro)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stanley Lawrence Lane, Jr on behalf of Frontline Processing Corporation (Lane, Stanley)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Charles Kennedy dated 9/25/09 re: Request for an extension of time for Woodforest and Frontline to answer up to and including 10/30/09. ENDORSEMENT: Request to answer or move by 10/30/09 is granted. Frontline Processing Corporation answer due 10/30/2009; Woodforest National Bank answer due 10/30/2009. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/6/09) (cd)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Frontline Processing Corporation waiver sent on 9/2/2009, answer due 11/2/2009. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Durango Merchant Services LLC served on 8/17/2009, answer due 9/8/2009. Service was accepted by Kairalla Shane. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Weigel, Robert)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2009 at 02:15 PM before Judge Harold Baer. (mro)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER addressed to Mr. Hogan from The Chambers of Harold Baer dated 9/8/09 re: There will be a Pre-Trial Conference (PTC) in the above case at 2:15 P.M. on Thursday, October 22, 2009 in Chambers, Room 2230. It is your responsibility to notify your adversary(ies) of the date and time with a copy to us. (mro)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (ama)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying PPR SA as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.(ama) (mro).
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (ama)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (ama)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Does, Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC, ABC Companies. (ama)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does, Frontline Processing Corporation, Woodforest National Bank, Durango Merchant Services LLC, ABC Companies. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 696569)Document filed by Gucci America, Inc.(ama) (mro).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gucci America, Inc. v. Frontline Processing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gucci America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Weigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontline Processing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodforest National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durango Merchant Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?