D'Amico Dry Limited v. Primera Maritime (Hellas) Limited
Plaintiff: D'Amico Dry Limited
Defendant: Primera Maritime (Hellas) Limited
Case Number: 1:2009cv07840
Filed: September 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: John G. Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333ad Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the parties have settled this action, it is, on this 4th day of May, 2020, hereby ordered that this matter be discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within 45 days of the date of this order, the plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. Any application to reopen must be filed within forty-five (45) days of this order ; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same forty-five-day period to be so-ordered by the Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. All pending motions are dismissed as moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/4/2020) (ks)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has considered all the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the reasons explained above, the plaintiff's motion fo r attorneys' fees and costs is granted in the amount of $898,807.44. The Clerk is directed to enter a fee award for the plaintiff, and against the defendants, in the amount of $898,807.44 for the plaintiff's attorneys' fees and costs. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/24/2019) (js)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 357 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: 351 Clerk's Judgment, 350 Memorandum & Opinion, . filed by Primebulk Shipmanagement Ltd., Movida Finance Inc., Chemnav Shipmanagement Ltd., Handy Finance Inc, Seasatin Navigation Inc., Element Finance Inc., Adalia Marine Co. Ltd., Chemnav Inc., Sonic Finance Inc., Mirage Finance Inc., Annamar Navigation Inc., Caldera Marine Co. Ltd., Seasafe Navigation Inc., Pasha Finance I nc. The Court has considered all the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the reasons explained above, the movants' motion for reconsideration is denied. The Clerk is directed to close docket number 357. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/20/2019) (kv)
August 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 OPINION AND ORDER re: 225 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and in Response to Plaintiff's Letter to the Court Dated November 2, 2015 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from William R. Bennett, III dated 11/4/15, 253 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence. The case is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing this case. The Clerk is also directed to close all pending motions and to close the case. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/13/2016) (kko)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 OPINION AND ORDER #105719. To the extent not specifically addressed above, any remaining arguments are either moot or without merit. For the reasons explained above, the moving defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings dismissing the plai ntiff's claims is denied. The Clerk is directed to close Docket Nos. 183, 185, and 199. re: 185 JOINT MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings .JOINT MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Chemnav Shipmanage ment Ltd., Chemnav Inc., Seasatin Navigation Inc., Annamar Navigation Inc., Adalia Marine Co. Ltd., Caldera Marine Co. Ltd., Seasafe Navigation Inc., 199 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on the Stay of Discovery on the Issue o f Alter-Ego addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from George M. Chalos dated July 6, 2015 filed by Chemnav Shipmanagement Ltd., Chemnav Inc., Seasatin Navigation Inc., Annamar Navigation Inc., Adalia Marine Co. Ltd., Caldera Marine Co. Ltd., Seasafe Navigation Inc., 183 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Thomas L. Tisdale dated May 19, 2015 filed by D'Amico Dry Limited. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/29/2015) (rjm) Modified on 7/30/2015 (ca).
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 117 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 116 Clerk's Judgment filed by D'Amico Dry Limited. The plaintiff's motion under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 60(b) and 59(e) is denied. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 117. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/28/2011) (mro)
March 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 OPINION AND ORDER. The defendants' motions to dismiss are granted. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment dismissing the amended complaint without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction, to close all pending motions, and to close this case. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/26/11) (rjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Amico Dry Limited v. Primera Maritime (Hellas) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Amico Dry Limited
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primera Maritime (Hellas) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?