Soroof Trading Development Company LTD. v. GE Fuel Cell Systems LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Soroof Trading Development Company LTD.
Defendant: GE Fuel Cell Systems LLC., GE Microgen Inc. and Plug Power Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01391
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants claim that they have been denied discovery regarding Plaintiff's name change. However, Defendants were provided with ample opportunity for discovery on this issue, and Defendants did in fact conduct such discovery , during both general fact discovery and a special discovery period dedicated to Plaintiff's name change ordered by Judge Francis. Judge Francis' Order is not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Accordingly, the Court OVERRULES Defenda nts' objections and AFFIRMS Judge Francis' Order granting Plaintiff's motion to amend the case caption so that Plaintiff's name reads "Soroof International Company, Ltd." (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/14/2014) (kgo)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 230 Motion to Amend/Correct: The motion to amend the Second Amended Complaint to correct the plaintiff's name (Docket no. 230) is granted. The Third Amended Complaint shall be filed within one week of the date of this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/8/2014) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ja)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 OPINION AND ORDER re: 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GE Microgen Inc., General Electric Company, Plug Power Inc., 184 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Soroof Trading Development Company LTD.: For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motion is DENIED, and Plaintiff's motion is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 178 and 184. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/30/2013) (tn)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER terminating 152 Motion for Protective Order. Accordingly, the defendants shall produce another Rule 30(b)(6) witness or properly prepare Mr. Scovello to testify about these topics within two weeks of the date of this Order. See Fab-Tech, Inc. v. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., No. 104CV275, 2006 WL 3702753, at *2 (D. Vt. Dec. 13, 2006) (When a designee is unable to adequately respond to certain relevant areas of inquiry, the designating party has a duty to substitute an a ppropriate deponent. (internal quotation marks omitted)); Sony Electronics, Inc. v. Soundview Technologies, Inc., 217 F.R.D. 104, 112 (D. Conn. 2002) (ordering plaintiff to produce additional Rule 30(b)(6) witness when its designee was unable to testify about topics included in deposition notice). Fact discovery is otherwise complete. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/28/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (lmb)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: re: 45 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(c). filed by GE Microgen Inc., 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by GE Microgen Inc., Plug Power Inc., 87 MOTION for Partial Summary Ju dgment. filed by Soroof Trading Development Company LTD., 74 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants GE Microgen, Inc. and Plug Power, Inc.. filed by Soroof Trading Development Company LTD. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted as to Plaintiffs third, fourth, fifth and sixth causes of action. Plaintiffs first and second causes of action are dismissed without prejudice to repleading. Plaintiffs motion for sanctions and Defendants' ; application for attorneys' fees and costs are both denied. Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment is granted with regard to the piercing of the veil of GEFCS and is denied in all other respects. Defendants' motion for summary judg ment dismissing all claims against GEFCS is granted. Defendants' motion for summary judgment dismissing all claims against GE Microgen and Plug Power is denied. Any amended complaint repleading the first and second causes of action must be filed by February 10, 2012. Failure to file a timely amended pleading will result in the dismissal of Plaintiffs Complaint in its entirety, with prejudice and without further advance notice. If an amended complaint is timely filed, the parties must meet with Magistrate Judge Francis to discuss the possibility of settlement and any outstanding pretrial matters. This Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves docket entry numbers 45, 74, 87 and 91. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/24/2012) (jfe)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soroof Trading Development Company LTD. v. GE Fuel Cell Systems LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soroof Trading Development Company LTD.
Represented By: James R. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Fuel Cell Systems LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Microgen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plug Power Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?