Naked Cowboy v. Brodsky Featured Case

New York City's 'Naked Cowboy' sues a 'Naked Cowgirl' for trademark infringement. Defendant Sarah Brodsky filed several counterclaims against cowboy Robert Burck.

Plaintiff: Naked Cowboy
Defendant: Sandra Brodsky
Case Number: 1:2010cv05539
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2011 13 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: This action be, and hereby is, dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. The U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York retains jurisdiction over this matter. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero, Not dated) (lnl)
March 11, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Nicholas Scott Barnhorst to E-MAIL Document No. 12 Stipulation to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. This document is not filed via ECF. (db)
March 11, 2011 12 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action, With Prejudice. Document filed by Sandra Brodsky, Naked Cowboy. (Barnhorst, Nicholas) Modified on 3/11/2011 (db).
January 31, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Settlement Conference held on 1/31/2011. Case did not settle. (mro)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 1/28/11) (cd)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2011 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 6A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 12/29/10) (rjm)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order 9 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Ellis from Yeni Yrizarry dated 12/10/10 re: On consent of the parties, the Conference (Settlement) for the above referenced matter which was previously scheduled for Tuesday, December 28th, 2010, has been moved to Monday, December 27, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Settlement Conference set for 12/27/2010 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 12/17/10) (djc)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 8 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: A Settlement Conference is set for 12/28/2010 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 12/8/10) (db)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement Theparties have requested a settlement conference as early a date as possible. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/2/10) (cd)
November 12, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/12/2010, ( Status Conference set for 3/18/2011 at 10:30 AM before Judge Victor Marrero )to be held at the close of discovery. (mbe)
October 8, 2010 6 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Joey Jackson dated 10/6/10 re: It is requested that the Preliminary Conference in the above-referenced matter be scheduled for November 12, 2010 at 1:00 p.m. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The initial conference herein is rescheduled to 11/12/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Initial Conference set for 11/12/2010 at 1:00 PM before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/8/10) (rjm)
September 28, 2010 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE ( Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2010 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/27/10) (jmi) Modified on 9/28/2010 (jmi).
September 10, 2010 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Naked Cowboy. Document filed by Sandra Brodsky. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Barnhorst, Nicholas)
August 25, 2010 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Sandra Brodsky served on 8/20/2010, answer due 9/10/2010. Service was accepted by Sandra Brodsky. Document filed by Naked Cowboy. (Jackson, Joey)
July 22, 2010 Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (mro)
July 21, 2010 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Naked Cowboy Enterprises as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Naked Cowboy.(mro)
July 21, 2010 Case Designated ECF. (mro)
July 21, 2010 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (mro)
July 21, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandra Brodsky. (mro)
July 21, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Sandra Brodsky. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 909347)Document filed by Naked Cowboy.(mro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naked Cowboy v. Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naked Cowboy
Represented By: Joey Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?