Hobbs v. Police officers of the City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Richard P. Hobbs
Defendant: Police officers of the City of New York, Michael Bloomberg, The City Council Members of New York City and The Head of the New York City Police Department
Case Number: 1:2010cv05717
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Westchester
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER for 67 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by The Head of the New York City Police Department, Michael Bloomberg, The City Council Members of New York City, Police officers of the City of New York, 95 Report and Recommendations: that Magistr ate Judge Pitman's Report & Recommendation is adopted. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted as to the following defendants: former Mayor Bloomberg, former Commissioner Kelly and the New York City Council. Defendants' mot ion for summary judgment is granted as to defendant the City of New York for acts that occurred after November 11, 2011. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied as to defendant the City of New York for acts that occurred on or before November 11, 2011. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/19/2014) (tn)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPINION AND ORDER. For all the foregoing reasons in this Opinion and Order, plaintiff's motions are denied as meritless except that I grant his motion in docket item 77 for the limited purpose of having considered it in connection with defendant s' motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to close docket items 74, 76, 77, 79-81 and 84. re: 77 MOTION FOR COURT TO RECOGNIZE SELF SWORN TESTIMONY OF GEORGE CICENON AS AN AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS f iled by Richard P. Hobbs, 84 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Richard P. Hobbs, 76 MOTION for Hearing filed by Richard P. Hobbs, 74 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Richard P. Hobbs, 81 MOTION TO OBJECT TO INCORREC T ANSWERS GIVEN BY PLAINTIFF AT DEPOSITION & CORRECT ANSWERS AS THEY SHOULD HAVE BEEN SAID, ACCEPTED AS TRUE ANSWERS filed by Richard P. Hobbs, 80 MOTION FOR THE COURT TO NOTIFY THE FBI OF ALLEGED COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT BY THE DEFENDANTS AND 18: SE CTION 241, 242 & 247 MADE BY PLAINTIFF & THE COURT ALSO TO NOTIFY THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF U.S. & N.Y.S. OF THE SAME filed by Richard P. Hobbs, 79 MOTION FOR COURT TO RECOGNIZE AS DISPOSITIVE ALL DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED AS AFFIRMATIONS OF STATEMENTS WITHIN filed by Richard P. Hobbs. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/6/2014). Copies sent (transmitted) By Chambers. (rjm) Modified on 2/7/2014 (rjm).
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPINION AND ORDER re: 58 MOTION to Compel filed by Richard P. Hobbs, 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint filed by Richard P. Hobbs. Accordingly, for all the foregoing reasons, plaintiff's motions to amend his complaint and to compel discovery (Docket Items 57 and 58) are denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close both motions. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 6/14/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ft)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs v. Police officers of the City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police officers of the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bloomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Council Members of New York City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Head of the New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?