Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. v. Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.
Defendant: Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC, Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC, DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, Courtroom Television Network LLC doing business as truTV, Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., Genco Entertainment, Inc., DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P. and Morgans Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv07244
Filed: September 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: William H Pauley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. ("HRCI") and Defendants Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Brad Lachman Productions, Inc. and Genco Entertainment, Inc. (Plaintiff and all of the foregoing Defendants are referred to hereinafter collectively as the "Parties"), by and through their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate to various matters, as follows: 1. Defendants Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Brad Lachman Productions, Inc. and Genco Entertainment, Inc. hereby consent to the granting of the motion filed by HRCI on February 8, 2013 [Dkt. No. 76] for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint, specifically including, but not limited to, that portion of the motion that amends HRCI's First Amended Complaint to dismiss Brad Lachman Productions, Inc. as a defendant in this action and substitutes Courtroom Television Network LLC, d/b/a truTV as a defendant in place of Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. 2. All claims asserted in this action at any time by HRCI against defendants Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., Genco Entertainment, Inc. and Courtroom Television Network LLC, d/b/a truTV, together with any defenses asserted against HRCI by such defendants, are hereby dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) with prejudice and without any award of costs or fees to any party, subject to the settlement agreement entered into by HRCI and certain of the foregoing defendants. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/22/2013) (mro)
July 10, 2013 Filing 95 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Jeremy Feigelson dated 6/14/2013 re: Counsel writes yesterday evening, plaintiff's counsel faxed a letter to the Court advising that settlement was not yet fully finalized and asking that the case be restored. Subsequent to that letter, agreement in principle was reached on the remaining issues. Counsel expects a stipulation of dismissal covering the balance of the case to be filed today. This moots plaintiff's request that the case be restored and a conference scheduled. (js)
July 8, 2013 Filing 96 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Bruce R. Ewing dated 5/28/2013 re: I write on behalf of counsel for all parties to request that the Court extend by one week the deadline by which the above-captioned proceeding can be restored to the Court's docket. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.(lmb)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Plaintiff Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. ("HRCI") and Defendants Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC, and Morgans Hotel Group Management LLC, by and through their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate, as follows: 1. Defendants Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC and Morgans Hotel Group Management LLC hereby consent to the granting of the motion filed by HRCI on February 8, 2013 [Dkt. No. 76] for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint, specifically including, but not limited to, that portion of the motion that amends HRCI's First Amended Complaint to add BREF HR, LLC and WG-Harmon, LLC as defendants in this action, and such motion shall be deemed granted upon entry of this Stipulation and Order of Dismissal by the Court. 2. All claims asserted in this action at any time by HRCI against defendants Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC, Morgans Hotel Group Management LLC, BREF HR, LLC and WG-Harmon, LLC, together with all counterclaims and affirmative defenses asserted by any of these defendants against HRCI, are hereby dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(2) with prejudice and without any award of costs or fees to any party. To the extent that the settlement agreement entered into by HRCI and certain of the foregoing defendants provides for resolution of certain matters by arbitration, those matters are preserved for the arbitrator notwithstanding this stipulation and order. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/20/2013) (lmb)
June 13, 2013 Filing 93 NOTICE of Request to Restore Case to Court Calendar. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Montcalm, Jonathan)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Jeremy Feigelson dated 6/4/2013 re: We write to request an additional one-week extension to complete settlement, from the current, deadline of June 6 to June 13. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted, but this is it! So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/5/2013). (rjm)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that this action has been or will be settled, the action is discontinued without costs to any party, and without prejudice to restoring it to this Court's calendar if such application is made by June 6, 2013. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/29/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mt)
May 2, 2013 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 88 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (mt) Modified on 6/14/2013 (mt).
May 2, 2013 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 89 TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (mt) Modified on 6/14/2013 (mt).
May 2, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/18/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 2, 2013 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/18/2013 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. It having been reported to this Court that this action has been or will be settled, the action is discontinued without costs to any party, and without prejudice to restoring it to this Court's calendar if such application is made within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all motions pending as of this date and mark this case closed. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/30/2013). (rjm)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. The parties and their counsel are directed to appear for a status conference on April 29, 2013 at 5:00 p.m. (Status Conference set for 4/29/2013 at 05:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/26/2013). Copies Sent By Chambers. (rjm)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: The parties and their counsel are directed to appear for a status conference on April 18, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. ( Status Conference set for 4/18/2013 at 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/5/2013) (js)
March 15, 2013 Filing 83 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #76 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
March 8, 2013 Filing 82 DECLARATION of Jeremy Feigelson in Opposition re: #76 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, Genco Entertainment, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Group LLC, Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Feigelson, Jeremy)
March 8, 2013 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #76 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Document filed by Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, Genco Entertainment, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Group LLC, Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.. (Feigelson, Jeremy)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley III from Bruce R. Ewing dated 2/14/2013 re: We write pursuant to instructions from the Clerk to respectfully request that Your Honor instruct the Clerk's Office to remove Brooke Ellen Pietrzak and Gianfranco Gustavo Mitrione as counsel of record for HRCI in this action. Both ms. Pietrzak and Mr. Mitrione have left their employment with Dorsey & Whitney LLP, and thus no longer represent HRCI. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the names listed above as counsel of record and terminate their notices of electronic filings in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/28/2013) (mt)
February 14, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gina Susan Spiegelman on behalf of Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. (Spiegelman, Gina)
February 8, 2013 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Bruce R. Ewing in Support re: #76 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-1, #3 Exhibit 1-2, #4 Exhibit 1-3, #5 Exhibit 1-4, #6 Exhibit 1-5, #7 Exhibit 1-6, #8 Exhibit 1-7, #9 Exhibit 1-8, #10 Exhibit 1-9, #11 Exhibit 1-10, #12 Exhibit 1-11, #13 Exhibit 2)(Ewing, Bruce)
February 8, 2013 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #76 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
February 8, 2013 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc..(Ewing, Bruce)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NINTH AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff s motion for leave to file the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed promptly by ECF no sooner than February 1,2013 and no later than February 8, 2013 or three (3) business days after the Court approves this Stipulation, whichever is later, and shall be deemed served on all Defendants upon filing. Defendants' opposition to that motion, if any, shall be filed no later than thirty (30) calendar days after the motion is filed. Such motion and any subsequent motions shall be governed by Rule 3 of this Court's Individual Practices. If no settlement is reached, the Parties will begin exchanging their respective document productions on February 8, 2013, and shall complete their respective productions no later than April 8, 2013, provided that (a) the Parties shall make at least one substantial interim production on or about March 8, 2013; and (b) production of any documents relevant only to factual matters that are the subject of any pending motions may be deferred until the Court rules, but must be completed within forty five (45) calendar days of any such ruling or by April 8, 2013, whichever is later. The Parties shall submit letters by March 29,2013 advising the Court and each other whether they intend to pursue expert discovery and, if so, identifying their experts and disclosing the subject of expert testimony. All fact discovery shall be completed by May 15,2013. The Parties shall submit a joint pre-trial order in accord with this Court's Individual Practices by July 15, 2013. The Court will hold a final pre-trial conference on July 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m., ( Fact Discovery due by 5/15/2013., Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/15/2013), ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/16/2012) (ago)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 EIGHTH AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff and the Hard Rock Defendants will continue settlement discussions as rapidly and as frequently as their schedules permit, with the assistance of Professor Francis McGovern, who has been engaged by these parties to assist in aiding the resolution of their dispute. Plaintiffs motion for leave to file the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed promptly by ECF no sooner than November 1, 2012 and no later than November 8, 2012 or three (3) business days after the Court approves this Stipulation, whichever is later, and shall be deemed served on all Defendants upon filing. Defendants' opposition to that motion, if any, shall be filed no later than thirty (30) days after the motion is filed. Such motion and any subsequent motions shall be governed by Rule 3 of this Court's Individual Practices. If no settlement is reached, the Parties will begin exchanging their respective document productions on November 8, 2012, and shall complete their respective productions no later than January 8, 2013, provided that (a) the Parties shall make at least one substantial interim production on or about December 7, 2012; and (b) production of any documents relevant only to factual matters that are the subject of any pending motions may be deferred until the Court rules, but must be completed within forty five (45) days of any such ruling or by January 8, 2013, whichever is later. The Parties shall submit letters by December 31, 2012 advising the Court and each other whether they intend to pursue expert discovery and, if so, identifying their experts and disclosing the subject of expert testimony. All fact discovery shall be completed by February 15, 2013. The Parties shall submit a joint pre-trial order in accord with this Court's Individual Practices by April 15, 2013. The Court will hold a final pre-trial conference on April 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. ( Fact Discovery due by 2/15/2013., Motions due by 11/8/2012., Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2013., Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/21/2012) (mro)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Jeremy Feigelson dated 7/31/2012 re: In light of what we believe is good progress towards a role for Professor McGovern in the mediation process, the parties respectfully renew their request for a last 90-day extension of all litigation deadlines. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The parties are directed to submit a joint case management schedule. So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/3/2012) (rjm)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Bruce R. Ewing dated 7/18/2012 re: We propose to provide a further status report to the Court on or before August 1, at which time we anticipate being able to propose a more definite schedule. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/26/2012) (rjm)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley III from Bruce R. Ewing dated 6/15/2012 re: In light of the parties' desire to continue settlement discussions and explore business mediation, the parties submit the enclosed Eighth Amended Stipulation and Order modifying all pre-trial dates identified in the prior Amended Stipulation and Order entered on April 18, 2012 [Docket No. 70]. The schedule reflected in the Eighth Amended Stipulation and Order was agreed to by all the parties. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to participate in a telephone conference with the Court on June 20, 2012 at 5:15 p.m. Plaintiff is directed to circulate a call-in number prior to the call.( Telephone Conference set for 6/20/2012 at 05:15 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/19/2012) (djc) Modified on 6/20/2012 (djc).
May 31, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Pretrial Conference held on 5/31/2012. (mro)
May 21, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Settlement Conference held on 5/21/2012. (pl)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SEVENTH AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff and the Hard Rock Defendants will meet in person for continued settlement discussions as rapidly and as frequently as their schedules permit. If no settlement is reached through such discussions, then the Parties (including principals with settlement authority) shall meet for another mediation session with the Honorable Robert W. Sweet in New York on May 21, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed promptly by ECF no sooner than June 11, 2012 and no later than June 18, 2012 or three (3) business days after the Court approves this Stipulation, whichever is later, and shall be deemed served on all Defendants upon filing. Defendants' opposition to that motion, if any, shall be filed no later than twenty-one (21) days after the motion is filed. Such motion and any subsequent motions shall be governed by Rule 3 of this Court's Individual Practices. If no settlement is reached, the Parties will begin exchanging their respective document productions on June 18, 2012, and shall complete their respective productions no later than August 17, 2012, provided that (a) the Parties shall make at least one substantial interim production on or about July 18, 2012; and (b) production of any documents relevant only to factual matters that are the subject of any pending motions may be deferred until the Court rules, but must be completed within forty five (45) days of any such ruling or by August 17, 2012, whichever is later. The Parties shall submit letters by August 10, 2012 advising the Court and each other whether they intend to pursue expert discovery and, if so, identifying their experts and disclosing the subject of expert testimony. All fact discovery shall be completed by September 24, 2012. The Parties shall submit a joint pre-trial order in accord with this Court's Individual Practices by November 26, 2012. The Court will hold a final pre-trial conference on December 7, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. ( Motions due by 6/18/2012., Fact Discovery due by 9/24/2012., Pretrial Order due by 11/26/2012., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III., Mediation Conference set for 5/21/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/18/2012) (mro)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SIXTH AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff and the Hard Rock Defendants will meet in person for continued settlement discussions as rapidly and as frequently as their schedules permit. If no settlement is reached through such discussions, then the Parties (including principals with settlement authority) shall meet for another mediation session with the Honorable Robert W. Sweet in New York on April 17, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed promptly by ECF no sooner than May 7, 2012 and no later than May 14, 2012 or three (3) business days after the Court approves this Stipulation, whichever is later, and shall be deemed served on all Defendants upon filing. Defendants' opposition to that motion, if any, shall be filed no later than twenty-one (21) days after the motion is filed. Such motion and any subsequent motions shall be governed by Rule 3 of this Court's Individual Practices. If no settlement is reached, the Parties will begin exchanging their respective document productions on May 14, 2012, and shall complete their respective productions no later than July 13, 2012, provided that (a) the Parties shall make at least one substantial interim production on or about June 13, 2012; and (b) production of any documents relevant only to factual matters that are the subject of any pending motions may be deferred until the Court rules, but must be completed within forty five (45) days of any such ruling or by July 13, 2012, whichever is later. The Parties shall submit letters by July 6, 2012 advising the Court and each other whether they intend to pursue expert discovery and, if so, identifying their experts and disclosing the subject of expert testimony. All fact discovery shall be completed by August 20, 2012. The Parties shall submit a joint pre-trial order in accord with this Court's Individual Practices by October 22, 2012. The Court will hold a final pre-trial conference on October 26, 2012 at 10:00 a.m.( Fact Discovery due by 8/20/2012., Motions due by 5/14/2012., Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2012., Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III., Mediation Conference set for 4/17/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/1/2012) (mro)
February 13, 2012 Filing 68 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley III from Bruce R. Ewing dated 2/2/2012 re: Counsel for the plaintiff requests that the deadline for plaintiff to file the aforementioned motion be extended by one week (i.e., so that the new deadline is between February 13 and 20, 2012) ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/13/2012) (ft)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FIFTH AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff and the Hard Rock Defendants will meet in person for continued settlement discussions as rapidly and as frequently as their schedule permit, and as further set forth in this document. Fact Discovery due by 6/20/2012. Motion by Plaintiff for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint due by 2/13/2012. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Mediation Session set for 1/19/2012 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/21/2011) (cd)
December 9, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Settlement Conference held on 12/9/2011. (ft)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FOURTH AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff and the Hard Rock Defendants will meet in person for continued settlement discussions as rapidly and as frequently as their schedules permit, and as further set forth in this document. ( Fact Discovery due by 5/15/2012. Motion by plaintiff for leave to file the Second Amended Complaint due by 1/6/2012. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/16/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/18/2011) (cd)
October 31, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Settlement Conference held on 10/31/2011. (djc)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 THIRD AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff and the Hard Rock Defendants will meet in person for a final settlement session on October 14, 2011. If no settlement is reached through such discussions, then the Parties (including principals with settlement authority) shall appear for a mediation session with the Honorable Robert W. Sweet in New York on October 31, 2011 at 9:30a.m. Plaintiffs motion for leave to file the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed promptly by ECF no sooner than October 31, 2011 and no later than November 7, 2011 or three (3) business days after the Court approves this Stipulation, whichever is later, and shall be deemed served on all Defendants upon filing. Defendants' opposition to that motion, if any, shall be filed no later than twenty-one (21) days after the motion is filed. Such motion and any subsequent motions shall be governed by Rule 3 of this Court's Individual Practices. If no settlement is reached, the Parties will begin exchanging their respective document productions on November 7, 2011, and shall complete their respective productions no later than January 6, 2012, provided that (a) the Parties shall make at least one substantial interim production on or about December 12, 2011; and (b) production of any documents relevant only to factual matters that are the subject of any pending motions may be deferred until the Court rules, but must be completed within forty five (45) days of any such ruling or by January 6, 2012, whichever is later. The Parties shall submit letters by December 30, 2011 advising the Court and each other whether they intend to pursue expert discovery and, if so, identifying their experts and disclosing the subject of expert testimony. All fact discovery shall be completed by March 16, 2012. The parties shall submit a joint pre-trial order in accord with this Court's Individual Practices by May 16, 2012. The Court will hold a final pre-trial conference on May 25, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. ( Discovery due by 5/16/2012., Motions due by 11/7/2011., Pretrial Order due by 5/16/2012., Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III., Mediation Conference set for 10/31/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/7/2011) (mro)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SECOND AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff and the Hard Rock Defendants will meet in person for a final settlement session on September 15, 2011. If no settlement is reached through such discussions, then the Parties (including principals with settlement authority) shall appear for a mediation session with the Honorable Robert W. Sweet in New York on September29, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed promptly by ECF no sooner than September 30 and no later than October 7, 2011 or three (3) business days after the Court approves this Stipulation, whichever is later,and shall be deemed served on all Defendants upon filing. Defendants' opposition to that motion, if any, shall be filed no later than twenty-one (21) days after the motion is filed.Such motion and any subsequent motions shall be governed by Rule 3 of this Court's Individual Practices.If no settlement is reached, the Parties will begin exchanging their respective document productions on October 7, 2011, and shall complete their respective productions no later than December 7, 2011, provided that (a) the Parties shall make at least one substantial interim production on or about November 14, 2011; and (b)production of any documents relevant only to factual matters that are the subject of any pending motions may be deferred until the Court rules, but must be completed within forty five ( 45) days of any such ruling or by December 7, 2011, whichever is later. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III., Mediation Conference set for 9/29/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Discovery due by 2/15/2012. Motions due by 10/7/2011. Pretrial Order due by 4/16/2012.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/21/2011) (js)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendants will pursue settlement discussions until at least September 2, 2011. To the extent no settlement is reached by September 2, 2011, Plaintiff and the Hard Rock Defendants will meet in person for a final settlement session on a mutually agreed date no later than September 14, 2011. If no settlement is reached through such discussions, then the Parties (including principals with settlement authority) shall appear for a mediation session with the Honorable Robert W. Sweet in New York on September 15, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs motion for leave to file the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed promptly by ECF no sooner than September 16 and no later than September 23, 2011 or three (3) business days after the Court approves this Stipulation, whichever is later, and shall be deemed served on all Defendants upon filing. Defendants' opposition to that motion, if any, shall be filed no later than twenty-one (21) days after the motion is filed. Such motion and any subsequent motions shall be governed by Rule 3 of this Court's Individual Practices. If no settlement is reached, the Parties will begin exchanging their respective document productions on September 23, 2011, and shall complete their respective productions no later than November 23, 2011, provided that (a) the Parties shall make at least one substantial interim production on or about October 31, 2011; and (b) production of any documents relevant only to factual matters that are the subject of any pending motions may be deferred until the Court rules, but must be completed within forty five (45) days of any such ruling or by November 23, 2011, whichever is later. The Parties shall submit letters by November 30, 2011 advising the Court and each other whether they intend to pursue expert discovery and, if so, identifying their experts and disclosing the subject of expert testimony. All fact discovery shall be completed by February 15, 2012. The Parties shall submit a joint pre-trial order in accord with this Court's Individual Practices by April 16, 2012. The Court will hold a final pre-trial conference on 5/4/12 at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/22/2011) (jfe)
July 12, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher George Karagheuzoff on behalf of Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. (Karagheuzoff, Christopher)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER for the foregoing reasons, as further set forth in this document, terminating #36 Motion to Dismiss; terminating #38 Motion to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/11/11) (cd)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Accordingly, the parties should schedule a mediation session with Senior Judge Sweet when he returns to the district. This Court is grateful for Senior Judge Sweet's assistance in this matter. Further, the parties are directed to submit a new proposed Amended Stipulation and Order with deadlines that reflect this postponement. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/11/11) Copies sent by Chambers (cd)
June 17, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Bruce Roy Millar Ewing on behalf of Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. New Address: Dorsey & Whitney, 51 West 52nd Street, New York, New York, USA 10019, 212-415-9200. (Ewing, Bruce)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER, that Plaintiff and the new owners and operators of the Las Vegas Hard Rock Hotel & Casino will pursue settlement discussions until June 14, 2011. To the extent no settlement is reached by May 30, 2011, Plaintiff and the new owners and operators of the Las Vegas Hard Rock Hotel & Casino will appear for a mediation session in New York with the Honorable Robert W. Sweet to be scheduled at a mutually convenient time. The Parties will ask Judge Sweet on or before April 29, 2011 to set that mediation date for a time in mid-June, 2011. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a motion to amend its first amended complaint, such motion to be filed no earlier than June l, 2011 and no later than June 21, 2011. All fact discovery shall be completed by October 31, 2011. The Parties shall submit a joint pre-trial order in accord with this Court's Individual Practices by December 19, 2011. The Court will hold a final pre-trial conference on January 6, 2012 at 10:30 a.m., not at 10:00 a.m. on September 9, 2011, as set forth in the Court's December 3, 2010 Scheduling Order. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/14/11) (pl)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley III from Jeremy Feigelson, dated 5/13/2011, re: Counsel for Hard Rock Defendants and the Equity Holder Defendants writes to ask the Court's advice about how to proceed with respect to mediation. ENDORSEMENT: The parties seek the Court's advice regarding on-going mediation efforts: Because the parties desire to meet "face-to-face" and it is inconvenient for them to meet with Judge Sweet while he is in New York, Judge Sweet has graciously agreed to meet them for an "in person session" in Sun Valley, Idaho. This Court will provide Judge Sweet's contact information to the parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/1/2011) (lnl)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/5/2011) (tro)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER Plaintiff and the new owners and operators of the Las Vegas Hard Rock Hotel & Casino will pursue settlement discussions until 6/14/11, and as further set forth in this document. Fact Discovery due by 10/31/2011. Motion to amend first amended complaint due by 6/14/2011, and no earlier than 6/1/11. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/19/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III, instead of 10:00 am on 9/9/11. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/2/11) (cd)
April 14, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Status Conference held on 4/14/2011. (mbe)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER: The pre-motion conference previously scheduled fro March 21, 2011, at 5:15 p.m. is rescheduled for April 14, 2011, at 1:45 p.m. in Courtroom 24A. So Ordered (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/11/2011) (js)
March 9, 2011 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on February 15, 2011 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. (djc)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall appear for a pre-motion conference on March 21, 2011, at 5:15 p.m. in Courtroom 24A. So Ordered (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/7/2011) (js)
March 1, 2011 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/15/2011 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. (dnd)
February 25, 2011 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Bennette Harris on behalf of Morgans Group LLC (Harris, Matthew)
February 25, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Bennette Harris on behalf of DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC (Harris, Matthew)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties having agreed to undergo mediation, the oral argument scheduled for January 28, 2011, at 12:00 p.m., is rescheduled for February 15, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/31/2011) (jfe)
January 14, 2011 Filing 47 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support / Reply Memorandum in Further Support of: 1) Equity Holder Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 2) Hard Rock Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss, to Compel Arbitration and for a Stay Pending Arbitration. Document filed by DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Group LLC, Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC. (Feigelson, Jeremy)
January 14, 2011 Filing 46 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss the Counterclaims of Defendants Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc. and HRHH IP, LLC.. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
January 7, 2011 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Julie M. Calderon Rizzo in Opposition re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss the Counterclaims of Defendants Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc. and HRHH IP, LLC.. Document filed by HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Julie M. Calderon Rizzo, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Julie M. Calderon Rizzo, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Julie M. Calderon Rizzo, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Julie M. Calderon Rizzo, #5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Julie M. Calderon Rizzo, #6 Exhibit F to Declaration of Julie M. Calderon Rizzo, #7 Exhibit G to Declaration of Julie M. Calderon Rizzo, #8 Exhibit H to Declaration of Julie M. Calderon Rizzo)(Calderon Rizzo, Julie)
January 7, 2011 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss the Counterclaims of Defendants Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc. and HRHH IP, LLC. / Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaims of the Hard Rock Defendants. Document filed by HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc.. (Feigelson, Jeremy)
January 7, 2011 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Bruce R. Ewing in Opposition. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part I, #2 Exhibit 1, Part II, #3 Exhibit 2, Part I, #4 Exhibit 2, Part II, #5 Exhibit 2, Part III, #6 Exhibit 2, Part IV, #7 Exhibit 2, Part V, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4)(Ewing, Bruce)
January 7, 2011 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to Compel Arbitration. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
December 17, 2010 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Julie M. Calderon Rizzo in Support. Document filed by DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Group LLC, Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part I (Declaration in Support of Doc No. 38), #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5)(Calderon Rizzo, Julie)
December 17, 2010 Filing 40 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Morgans Hotel Group Co. and Credit Suisse Group AG as Corporate Parent. Document filed by DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Group LLC, Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC.(Feigelson, Jeremy)
December 17, 2010 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of (1) Equity Holder Defendants' Motion To Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, etc. (See Doc #38). Document filed by DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Group LLC, Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC. (Feigelson, Jeremy)
December 17, 2010 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of (1) Equity Holder Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim and (2) Hard Rock Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss, To Compel Arbitration and For a Stay Pending Arbitration (N.B.: This "combined" motion is submitted pursuant to the direction of the Honorable Judge Pauley).. Document filed by DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Group LLC, Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC. Responses due by 1/7/2011 Return Date set for 1/28/2011 at 12:00 PM.(Feigelson, Jeremy)
December 17, 2010 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss the Counterclaims of Defendants Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc. and HRHH IP, LLC.. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix 1 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaims of Defendants Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc. and HRHH IP, LLC, #2 Appendix Appendix 2 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaims of Defendants Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc. and HRHH IP, LLC)(Ewing, Bruce)
December 17, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Counterclaims of Defendants Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc. and HRHH IP, LLC. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc..(Ewing, Bruce)
December 7, 2010 Filing 35 ANSWER to Amended Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. Document filed by Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC. Related document: #27 Amended Complaint,, filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feigelson, Jeremy)
December 7, 2010 Filing 34 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., Genco Entertainment, Inc.. Related document: #27 Amended Complaint,, filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc..(Rittinger, James)
December 7, 2010 Filing 33 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.. Related document: #27 Amended Complaint,, filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc..(Rittinger, James)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint letter informing the Court whether they agree to mediation by 12/13/10. Motions, not to exceed 35 pages, due by 12/17/2010. Responses, not to exceed 25 pages, due by 1/7/2011 Replies not to exceed 10 pages due by 1/14/2011. Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2011, see document for other deadlines. Oral Argument set for 1/28/2011 at 12:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/19/2011. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/3/10) (cd)
December 2, 2010 Filing 31 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc..(Ewing, Bruce)
November 29, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-E-MAIL PDF...PDF must be under 2.5 megabites. Note to Attorney Bruce Roy Millar Ewing for noncompliance with Section (14.3) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #27 Amended Complaint,, to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (mro)
November 24, 2010 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P. served on 11/23/2010, answer due 12/14/2010. Document filed by DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P.. (Mitrione, Gianfranco)
November 24, 2010 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC served on 11/23/2010, answer due 12/14/2010. Document filed by DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC. (Mitrione, Gianfranco)
November 24, 2010 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Morgans Group LLC served on 11/23/2010, answer due 12/14/2010. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Mitrione, Gianfranco)
November 23, 2010 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, Genco Entertainment, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. (mro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2010: #1 First Amended Complaint Part 2, #2 Exhibits 1-3, #3 Exhibits 4-5, #4 Exhibits 5-10) (ama).
November 23, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC, DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, Genco Entertainment, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.(mro)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Bruce R. Ewing dated 11/17/10 re: We write both in response to the November 12th letter from counsel for some of the defendants, in which they advise the Court of their intention to file a motion to dismiss some of HRCI's claims, and pursuant to paragraph 3A of the Court's Individual Practices to seek leave to file HRCI's own motion to dismiss counterclaims filed by some of those same defendants. If the Court wishes to discuss the respective motions at an inperson conference before setting a briefing schedule, we ask that the Court consider rescheduling the upcoming conference for December 3 or 10, or any other date convenient for the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. This Court will hold a pre-motion conference on the parties proposed motions to dismiss on December 3, 2010, at 10:45 am. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/3/2010 at 10:45 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/22/10) (db)
November 12, 2010 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. Document filed by Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feigelson, Jeremy)
November 12, 2010 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Various (Refer to Document) as Corporate Parent. Document filed by DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC.(Feigelson, Jeremy)
November 12, 2010 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Turner Broadcasting System, Inc..(Rittinger, James)
November 12, 2010 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., Genco Entertainment, Inc..(Rittinger, James)
November 12, 2010 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Time Warner Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Turner Broadcasting System, Inc..(Rittinger, James)
November 12, 2010 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brad Lachman Productions, Inc..(Rittinger, James)
November 12, 2010 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Genco Entertainment, Inc..(Rittinger, James)
October 12, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Frederick Rittinger on behalf of Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., Genco Entertainment, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. (Rittinger, James)
October 12, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James J. Regan on behalf of Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., Genco Entertainment, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. (Regan, James)
October 11, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie Marie Calderon Rizzo on behalf of DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC (Calderon Rizzo, Julie)
October 11, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Feigelson on behalf of DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC (Feigelson, Jeremy)
October 11, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce P. Keller on behalf of DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC (Keller, Bruce)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2010 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/6/10) (djc)
October 4, 2010 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Hard Rock Hotel, Inc. served on 9/22/2010, answer due 10/13/2010. Service was accepted by Heather Hughes. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
October 4, 2010 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC served on 9/22/2010, answer due 10/13/2010. Service was accepted by Heather Hughes. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
October 4, 2010 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Genco Entertainment, Inc. served on 9/22/2010, answer due 10/13/2010. Service was accepted by Bob Baral. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
October 4, 2010 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Morgans Hotel Group Co. served on 9/21/2010, answer due 10/12/2010. Service was accepted by Lauren Farrell. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
October 4, 2010 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC served on 9/21/2010, answer due 10/12/2010. Service was accepted by Lauren Farrell. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
October 4, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. served on 9/22/2010, answer due 10/13/2010. Service was accepted by Shakinah Edwards. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
October 4, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. HRHH IP, LLC served on 9/21/2010, answer due 10/12/2010. Service was accepted by Lauren Farrell. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
October 4, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC served on 9/21/2010, answer due 10/12/2010. Service was accepted by Pamela Flemings. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
October 4, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Brad Lachman Productions, Inc. served on 9/22/2010, answer due 10/13/2010. Service was accepted by Bill Bracken. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
September 27, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi)
September 27, 2010 CASE DECLINED AS NOT SIMILAR. Case referred as similar to 1:08-cv-8953 and declined by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan and returned to wheel for assignment. (ldi)
September 27, 2010 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (ldi)
September 21, 2010 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.(ama)
September 21, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, Genco Entertainment, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 915542)Document filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint part 2, #2 Complaint part 3, #3 Complaint part 4)(ama)
September 21, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brad Lachman Productions, Inc., DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC, Genco Entertainment, Inc., HRHH IP, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hard Rock Hotel, Inc., Morgans Hotel Group Co., Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. (ama)
September 21, 2010 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis A. Kaplan as possibly similar to 1:08-cv-8953. (ama)
September 21, 2010 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
September 21, 2010 Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. v. Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Roy Millar Ewing
Represented By: Brooke Ellen Pietrzak
Represented By: Christopher George Karagheuzoff
Represented By: Gianfranco Gustavo Mitrione
Represented By: Gina Susan Spiegelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hard Rock Hotel Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Represented By: Jeremy Feigelson
Represented By: Julie Marie Calderon Rizzo
Represented By: Matthew Bennette Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hard Rock Hotel, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Represented By: Jeremy Feigelson
Represented By: Julie Marie Calderon Rizzo
Represented By: Matthew Bennette Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRHH IP, LLC
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Represented By: Jeremy Feigelson
Represented By: Julie Marie Calderon Rizzo
Represented By: Matthew Bennette Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgans Hotel Group Co.
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Represented By: Jeremy Feigelson
Represented By: Julie Marie Calderon Rizzo
Represented By: Matthew Bennette Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgans Hotel Group Management, LLC
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Represented By: Jeremy Feigelson
Represented By: Julie Marie Calderon Rizzo
Represented By: Matthew Bennette Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLJMB HRH Voteco LLC
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Represented By: Jeremy Feigelson
Represented By: Julie Marie Calderon Rizzo
Represented By: Matthew Bennette Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtroom Television Network LLC doing business as truTV
Represented By: James J. Regan
Represented By: James Frederick Rittinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Lachman Productions, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Regan
Represented By: James Frederick Rittinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genco Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Regan
Represented By: James Frederick Rittinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLJ MB IV HRH, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Feigelson
Represented By: Matthew Bennette Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLJ Merchant Banking Partners IV, L.P.
Represented By: Jeremy Feigelson
Represented By: Matthew Bennette Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgans Group LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Feigelson
Represented By: Matthew Bennette Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?