A&E Television Networks, LLC et al v. Pivot Point Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: A&E Television Networks, LLC and D&D Television Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Pivot Point Entertainment, LLC, Duane Chapman and Alice Barmore-Smith Chapman
Case Number: 1:2010cv09422
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G. Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER re: 206 MOTION to Strike and Preclude. On May 2, 2013, Plaintiffs filed a motion requesting that certain of Defendant Pivot Point's pre-trial filings be struck and that Pivot Point be precluded from presenting certain direct testimony. ( Dkt. Nos. 206-208) The basis for Plaintiffs' motion was that Pivot Point had failed to abide by the deadlines set in this Court's scheduling order, (Dkt. No. 200), or by the terms of this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. Al though Plaintiffs' motion did not specifically request that the testimony of Alice Barmore-Smith Chapman ("Ms. Chapman") be precluded, they did note, in support of their motion, that Pivot Point "relies on the planned testimony of persons for whom it should have submitted, but failed to submit, affidavits pursuant to Rule 5(D)(iii) [of this Court's Individual Practices], including [Ms.] Chapman.... " (P1. Br. 3). Under the facts and circumstances, wherein Pivot Poin t failed to comply with the Court's original order regarding pretrial submissions, failed to abide by the terms of the Court's order regarding the submission of Ms. Chapman's testimony, and failed to abide by the Court's Individua l Practices regarding requests for adjournment, the Court concludes that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(b), sanctions are appropriate. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b); see also Southern New England Telephone Co. v. Global NAPs Inc., 624 F. 3d 123, 144 (2d Cir. 2010) (discussing Rule 37(b) sanctions and noting that "[t]he district court is free to consider the full record in the case in order to select the appropriate sanction" (internal quotations omitted). Having considered all relevant factors, see Global NAPs Inc. (quoting Aqiwal v. Mid Island Mortg. Corp., 555 F.3d 298, 302 (2d Cir. 2009)), the Court concludes and SO ORDERS that the just result in this case is to preclude Defendants from presenting Ms. Chapman's testimony and from calling her as a witness at trial. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b); see also Scherbakoskiy v. Da Capo Al Fine, Ltd., 490 F.3d 130, 135 (2d Cir. 2007). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/11/2013) (ft) Modified on 6/11/2013 (ft).
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed herein, THE COURT ORDERS that: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Pivot Point's Motion for Summary Judgment against Plaintiffs is GRANTED in part and D ENIED in part; and Pivot Point's Motion for Summary Judgment against the Chapmans is DENIED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that a conference in this matter will be held on April 4, 2013, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Cour t for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. THE COURT FINALLY ORDERS that, pursuant to Rule SA of this Court's Individual Rules in Civil Cases, the parties' shall submit to the Court their proposed joint pretrial order within fourteen days of this decision. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/27/2013) (cd)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, this interpleader action will proceed. Plaintiffs are directed to deposit into this Court's Registry, by January 25, 2011, $2,400,732.59. Plaintiffs are likewise directed to deposit into the Court's Registry additional fees and royalties due under the Pivot Point Agreement as those amounts become due. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/18/2011) (jpo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A&E Television Networks, LLC et al v. Pivot Point Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&E Television Networks, LLC
Represented By: Martin David Edel
Represented By: Adam J. Safer
Represented By: Cameron Altman Stracher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&D Television Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Martin David Edel
Represented By: Adam J. Safer
Represented By: Cameron Altman Stracher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pivot Point Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Howard Ernest King
Represented By: Stephen David Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Chapman
Represented By: Andrew Brad Brettler
Represented By: Martin D. Singer
Represented By: Paul N. Sorrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Barmore-Smith Chapman
Represented By: Andrew Brad Brettler
Represented By: Martin D. Singer
Represented By: Paul N. Sorrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?