Christian Louboutin S.A. et al v. Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C. and Christian Louboutin
Defendant: Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent, John Does A-Z, Jane Does A-Z and XYZ Companies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2011cv02381
Filed: April 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2011 First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Supplemental Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 66 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 59 Order, 63 Endorsed Letter, 64 Endorsed Letter, 65 Endorsed Letter, 60 Order Staying Case, 61 Transcript, 62 Notice of Filing Transcript, USCA Case Number 11-3303, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
September 8, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A to the Declaration of Kate Schrader (oversized filing authorized by 9/7/11 court order -dkt # 65) re: 38 Declaration in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A - Part 6, # 7 Exhibit A - Part 7, # 8 Exhibit A - Part 8, # 9 Exhibit A - Part 9, # 10 Exhibit A - Part 10, # 11 Exhibit A - Part 11)(Hamid, Jyotin)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jyotin Hamid dated 8/31/2011 re: Counsel requests that Your Honor enter an Order permitting an oversize filing by ECF or, in the alternative, permitting a hard copy filing of the exhibit. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Request GRANTED. Plaintiff is authorized to file the Exhibit A referred to above as an oversize document by ECF or by hard copy. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/2/2011) (tro)
August 30, 2011 Filing 64 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from David H. Bernstein dated 8/1/2011 re: Louboutin's trademark registration never should have been granted. Whether the registration is for a "lacquered red sole" generally, or only the particular shade printed on Registration No, 3,361,597, a single primary color for an article of fashion is aesthetically functional and, as such, no fashion company should be permitted to monopolize that color. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/29/2011) (lmb)
August 29, 2011 Filing 63 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Lee Carl Bromberg dated 8/26/2011 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs request that Exhibits 2-4 be redacted from defendants' 8/1/2011 letter and not be included in the record on appeal. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter submitted to the Court by plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/29/2011) (ft)
August 25, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/19/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 25, 2011 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/19/2011 before Judge Victor Marrero. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: that this case is Stayed pending resolution of the appeal (Dkt. No. 58) filed by plaintiffs Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C. and christian Louboutin individually. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/19/2011) (ft)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. By Decision and Order dated August 10, 2011, the Court scheduled a case management conference for August 17, 2011. The parties request that the conference be adjourned. Accordingly, the conference previously scheduled for August 17, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. is adjourned to August 19, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/15/2011). (djc)
August 16, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge Victor Marrero. (djc)
August 15, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 8/15/2011. (js)
August 15, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 58 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
August 15, 2011 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 58 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
August 15, 2011 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 42 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 26 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 23 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 41 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 53 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 39 Answer to Amended Counterclaim filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 6 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent, Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 48 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 18 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 47 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 16 Endorsed Letter, 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent, Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 14 Stipulation and Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, 46 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 34 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 21 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 35 Declaration in Opposition to Motion filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 44 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 33 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 24 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 22 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent, Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 50 Notice of Change of Address filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 45 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 40 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 36 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 49 Notice (Other) filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 37 Declaration in Opposition to Motion filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 52 Endorsed Letter, 12 Protective Order, 25 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 1 Complaint, filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 54 Transcript, 57 Notice of Filing Transcript, 19 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 43 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 32 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 31 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 11 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiff's Second Counterclaim filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 55 Notice of Filing Transcript, 30 Notice of Appearance filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 20 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 28 Amended Counterclaim, filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 38 Declaration in Opposition to Motion filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 13 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 29 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., 9 Answer to Counterclaim filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., 56 Transcript, 51 Endorsed Letter, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
August 12, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEAL from 53 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 465401013971. (tp)
August 10, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 7/27/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 10, 2011 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 7/27/2011 before Judge Victor Marrero. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/5/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/11/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 10, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 7/22/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 10, 2011 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 7/22/2011 before Judge Victor Marrero. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/5/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/11/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECISION AND ORDER denying 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons stated above, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 17) of plaintiffs Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C. and Christian Louboutin individually for a preliminary injunction is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that counsel for all parties are directed to appear for a case management conference on August 17, 2011 at 2:00 p.m., at which Louboutin shall show cause why the record of this action as it now exists should not be converted into a motion for partial summary judgment cancelling Louboutin's trademark at the issue here for the reasons stated in the Court's decision above. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/10/2011) (mro)
August 10, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2011 at 02:00 PM before Judge Victor Marrero. (mro)
August 3, 2011 Filing 52 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Harley I. Lewin dated 8/2/11 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs advise that they received a copy of the letter brief of even date from David Bernstein, together with exhibits, submitted on behalf of the defendants. Plaintiffs write to object to that letter and request it be rejected by the Court. ENDORSEMENT: The Court agrees that defendants' letter dated 8-1-11 contains some text and exhibits that go beyond the scope of the Court's request at the 7-27-11 conference. The Court will disregard the non-complying submissions. No further briefing on this matter is necessary. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/2/2011) (mro)
August 1, 2011 Filing 51 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Harley I. Lewin dated 7/29/2011 re: Counsel respectfully request Louboutin's application for a preliminary injunction be granted. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by plaintiff. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/29/2011) (jfe)
July 29, 2011 Filing 50 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Harley Irwin Lewin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: McCarter & English, LLP, 245 Park Avenue, 27th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10167, 212-609-6818. (Lewin, Harley)
July 27, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero: Telephone Conference held on 7/27/2011. (lmb)
July 22, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero: Oral Argument held on 7/22/2011 re: 14 Stipulation and Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings. (lmb)
July 19, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE of Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 44.1. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bromberg, Lee)
July 19, 2011 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Harley I. Lewin (Supplemental) in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Bromberg, Lee)
July 19, 2011 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Anne H. Chasser in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bromberg, Lee)
July 19, 2011 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Gabriele Goldaper in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bromberg, Lee)
July 19, 2011 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Lynne Beresford in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3, # 5 Exhibit C)(Bromberg, Lee)
July 19, 2011 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Sharad Misra in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bromberg, Lee)
July 19, 2011 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Xavier Ragot in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Bromberg, Lee)
July 19, 2011 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Roman Khaykin (Second Supplemental) in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bromberg, Lee)
July 19, 2011 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Robert Klein (Supplemental) in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Bromberg, Lee)
July 19, 2011 Filing 40 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Bromberg, Lee)
July 18, 2011 Filing 39 ANSWER to 28 Amended Counterclaim,. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin.(Bromberg, Lee)
July 12, 2011 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Kate Schrader in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S.. (Bernstein, David)
July 12, 2011 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Gerald L. Ford in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S.. (Bernstein, David)
July 12, 2011 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Hal Poret in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S.. (Attachments: # 1 Poret Declaration, Part 2)(Bernstein, David)
July 12, 2011 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Samuels in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S.. (Bernstein, David)
July 12, 2011 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Natalia Vaissie in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Exhibit C and D)(Bernstein, David)
July 12, 2011 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S.. (Bernstein, David)
July 12, 2011 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Jyotin Hamid in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-H)(Hamid, Jyotin)
July 5, 2011 Filing 31 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiff's Second Counterclaim.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lewin, Harley)
July 1, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rayna S. Feldman on behalf of Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S. (Feldman, Rayna)
June 27, 2011 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiff's Second Counterclaim.. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S.. (Bernstein, David)
June 27, 2011 Filing 28 FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM amending 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, against Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin.Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.. Related document: 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, filed by Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc..(Bernstein, David)
June 21, 2011 Filing 27 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
June 21, 2011 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Harley I. Lewin in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (redacted - filed under seal), # 2 Exhibit B (redacted - filed under seal), # 3 Exhibit C (redacted - filed under seal), # 4 Exhibit D (redacted - filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit E (redacted - filed under seal))(Bromberg, Lee)
June 21, 2011 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Kara Pfaffenbach in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Bromberg, Lee)
June 21, 2011 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Kristina Musailov in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit B-3, # 6 Exhibit B-4, # 7 Exhibit B-5, # 8 Exhibit B-6, # 9 Exhibit B-7, # 10 Exhibit B-8, # 11 Exhibit C-1, # 12 Exhibit C-2, # 13 Exhibit C-3, # 14 Exhibit C-4, # 15 Exhibit C-5, # 16 Exhibit C-6, # 17 Exhibit C-7, # 18 Exhibit C-8, # 19 Exhibit C-9, # 20 Exhibit C-10, # 21 Exhibit C-11, # 22 Exhibit C-12, # 23 Exhibit C-13, # 24 Exhibit C-14, # 25 Exhibit C-15, # 26 Exhibit C-16, # 27 Exhibit C-17, # 28 Exhibit C-18, # 29 Exhibit C-19, # 30 Exhibit C-20, # 31 Exhibit C-21, # 32 Exhibit C-22, # 33 Exhibit C-23, # 34 Exhibit C-24, # 35 Exhibit C-25, # 36 Exhibit C-26, # 37 Exhibit C-27, # 38 Exhibit C-28, # 39 Exhibit C-29, # 40 Exhibit D, # 41 Exhibit E-1, # 42 Exhibit E-2, # 43 Exhibit E-3, # 44 Exhibit F)(Bromberg, Lee)
June 21, 2011 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Shawna Rose in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit B-1, # 5 Exhibit B-2, # 6 Exhibit C-1, # 7 Exhibit C-2, # 8 Exhibit C-3, # 9 Exhibit C-4, # 10 Exhibit C-5, # 11 Exhibit C-6, # 12 Exhibit C-7, # 13 Exhibit C-8, # 14 Exhibit C-9, # 15 Exhibit C-10, # 16 Exhibit D, # 17 Exhibit E, # 18 Exhibit F, # 19 Exhibit G, # 20 Exhibit H, # 21 Exhibit I, # 22 Exhibit J-1, # 23 Exhibit J-2, # 24 Exhibit J-3, # 25 Exhibit J-4a, # 26 Exhibit J-4b, # 27 Exhibit J-5, # 28 Exhibit J-6, # 29 Exhibit J-7, # 30 Exhibit J-8, # 31 Exhibit J-9, # 32 Exhibit J-10, # 33 Exhibit J-11, # 34 Exhibit J-12, # 35 Exhibit J-13, # 36 Exhibit J-14, # 37 Exhibit J-15, # 38 Exhibit J-16, # 39 Exhibit K-1, # 40 Exhibit K-2, # 41 Exhibit K-3, # 42 Exhibit L)(Bromberg, Lee)
June 21, 2011 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Alexis Mourot in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3, # 5 Exhibit B-4, # 6 Exhibit B-5, # 7 Exhibit C-1, # 8 Errata C-2, # 9 Exhibit C-3, # 10 Exhibit C-4, # 11 Exhibit C-5, # 12 Exhibit C-6, # 13 Exhibit C-7, # 14 Exhibit C-8, # 15 Exhibit C-9, # 16 Exhibit C-10, # 17 Exhibit C-11, # 18 Exhibit C-12, # 19 Exhibit C-13, # 20 Exhibit C-14, # 21 Exhibit C-15, # 22 Exhibit C-16, # 23 Exhibit C-17, # 24 Exhibit C-18, # 25 Exhibit C-19, # 26 Exhibit C-20, # 27 Exhibit D, # 28 Exhibit E-1, # 29 Exhibit E-2, # 30 Exhibit F-1, # 31 Exhibit F-2, # 32 Exhibit F-3, # 33 Exhibit F-4, # 34 Exhibit F-5, # 35 Exhibit F-6, # 36 Exhibit F-7, # 37 Exhibit G, # 38 Exhibit H, # 39 Exhibit I, # 40 Exhibit J-1, # 41 Exhibit J-2, # 42 Exhibit J-3, # 43 Exhibit J-4, # 44 Exhibit J-5, # 45 Exhibit K-1, # 46 Exhibit K-2a, # 47 Exhibit K-2b, # 48 Exhibit K-3, # 49 Exhibit K-4a, # 50 Exhibit K-4b, # 51 Exhibit K-5, # 52 Exhibit K-6, # 53 Exhibit K-7, # 54 Exhibit K-8, # 55 Exhibit K-9, # 56 Exhibit K-10, # 57 Exhibit K-11, # 58 Exhibit K-12, # 59 Exhibit K-13, # 60 Exhibit K-14, # 61 Exhibit K-15, # 62 Exhibit K-16, # 63 Exhibit L-1, # 64 Exhibit L-2)(Bromberg, Lee)
June 21, 2011 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Robert Klein in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bromberg, Lee)
June 21, 2011 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Roman Khaykin (Supplemental Declaration) in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bromberg, Lee)
June 21, 2011 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Roman Khaykin in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-1, # 5 Exhibit D-2, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H-1, # 10 Exhibit H-2, # 11 Exhibit I-1, # 12 Exhibit I-2, # 13 Exhibit I-3)(Bromberg, Lee)
June 21, 2011 Filing 18 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Bromberg, Lee)
June 21, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. Return Date set for 7/22/2011 at 03:30 PM.(Bromberg, Lee)
June 17, 2011 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 15 ENDORSED LETTER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ae)
June 17, 2011 Filing 16 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Lee Carl Bromberg dated 6/16/2011 re: request that the Court permit the parties to file a forty-five page memorandum of law in connection with plaintiff's application for preliminary injunction. ENDORSEMENT: Request DENIED. The Court notes that plaintiff's initial memorandum in support of injunction relief exceeded the Court's page limitation, without seeking prior authorization. This case is no more fact sensitive then a multiple of other similar actions that are considered by this Court on motions that comply with the 25 page limitation. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/17/2011) (jar)
June 17, 2011 Filing 14 AMENDED STIPULATED DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION: Depositions may be conducted between 5/23/2011 and 6/14/2011. One deposition will be conducted on 6/17/2011. Plaintiffs may file and amended and updated Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion by 6/21/2011. Defendants shall serve their opposition by 7/12/2011. Plaintiffs shall serve their reply papers by 7/19/2011. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (Responses due by 6/21/2011, Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2011 at 03:30 PM before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/17/2011) (jar)
June 13, 2011 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiff's Second Counterclaim.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bromberg, Lee)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCUMENTS AND OTHER INFORMATION PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/13/2011) (tro)
June 10, 2011 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #13) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiff's Second Counterclaim.. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bromberg, Lee) Modified on 6/17/2011 (lb).
June 10, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiff's Second Counterclaim. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin.(Bromberg, Lee)
June 10, 2011 Filing 9 ANSWER to 8 Counterclaim. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin.(Bromberg, Lee)
May 20, 2011 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc..(Bernstein, David)
May 20, 2011 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying PPR Group as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S..(Bernstein, David)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION: 1. On or before April 22, 2011, the parties shall serve all discovery requests limited to the issues on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as follows: No more than 3 written interrogatories; No more than 12 requests for the production of documents; and Any Rule 30(b)(6) notice of deposition. 2. By May 20, 2011, Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Plaintiffs' time to respond to any motion made by Defendants with respect to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be governed by F.R.C.P, and the Local Rules of this Court. 3. By May 23, 2011, Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' discovery requests served pursuant to paragraph 1. 4. By May 23, 2011, Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' discovery requests served pursuant to paragraph 1. 5. From May 23 to June 14, 2011, Plaintiffs and Defendants shall conduct depositions if they so choose. The number of depositions to be taken shall be agreed upon by the parties' counsel but shall be limited to testimony that may directly bear upon the Motion for Preliminary Injunction before this Court. 6. By June 17, 2011, Plaintiffs may file an amended and updated Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, together with any supplemental supporting materials. 7. By July 8, 2011, Defendants shall serve their opposition papers to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 8. By July 15, 2011, Plaintiffs shall serve their reply papers to Defendants' opposition papers to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. 9. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be held by the Court on July 22, 2011 at 3:30 o'clock in the p.m., or at such other time as is agreed upon by counsel and the Court. SO ORDERED. Yves Saint Laurent answer due 5/20/2011; Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc. answer due 5/20/2011; Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc. answer due 5/20/2011; Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S. answer due 5/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/21/2011) (lnl)
April 21, 2011 Set Hearing; Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2011 at 03:30 PM before Judge Victor Marrero. (lnl)
April 15, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill van Berg on behalf of Yves Saint Laurent, Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S. (van Berg, Jill)
April 15, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jyotin Hamid on behalf of Yves Saint Laurent, Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S. (Hamid, Jyotin)
April 15, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David H. Bernstein on behalf of Yves Saint Laurent, Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S. (Bernstein, David)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C., Christian Louboutin.(ama) (ama).
April 7, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Does A-Z, John Does A-Z, XYZ Companies 1-10, Yves Saint Laurent, Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401003434)Document filed by Christian Louboutin, Christian Louboutin S.A., Christian Louboutin, L.L.C.(ama) (ama).
April 7, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jane Does A-Z, John Does A-Z, XYZ Companies 1-10, Yves Saint Laurent, Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc., Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S. (ama)
April 7, 2011 Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (ama)
April 7, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
April 7, 2011 Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian Louboutin S.A. et al v. Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Louboutin S.A.
Represented By: Lee Carl Bromberg
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Louboutin, L.L.C.
Represented By: Lee Carl Bromberg
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Louboutin
Represented By: Lee Carl Bromberg
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Bernstein
Represented By: Jyotin Hamid
Represented By: Jill van Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yves Saint Laurent America Holding, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Bernstein
Represented By: Jyotin Hamid
Represented By: Jill van Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yves Saint Laurent S.A.S.
Represented By: David H. Bernstein
Represented By: Jyotin Hamid
Represented By: Jill van Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yves Saint Laurent
Represented By: David H. Bernstein
Represented By: Jyotin Hamid
Represented By: Jill van Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?