Snyder et al v. Fantasy Interactive Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Julie Snyder and Karen Gould
Defendant: Fantasy Interactive Inc., David Martin, Camilla Martin and Ben Knight
Case Number: 1:2011cv03593
Filed: May 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: William H. Pauley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2012 Filing 31 ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against Karen Gould, Julie Snyder. Document filed by David Martin, Ben Knight, Camilla Martin, Fantasy Interactive Inc..(Drouin, Aimee)
February 29, 2012 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Fantasy Interactive Inc., Ben Knight, Camilla Martin, David Martin with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Julie Snyder, Karen Gould. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Julie Snyder, Karen Gould.(pl)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' motion is granted with respect to Plaintiffs' Electronic Communications Privacy Act claims and New York Penal Law claims, and those claims are dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' motion to dismiss is also granted with respect to Gould's Fair Labor Standards Act claim and New York Labor Law claims, but those claims are dismissed without prejudice. Gould must submit her amended complaint by February 29, 2012. Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied with respect to Plaintiffs' Stored Communications Act claim, and Gould's breach of contract and Hawaii privacy law claims. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF. No. 17. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/9/2012) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (lmb)
November 29, 2011 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Aimee A. Drouin in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Fantasy Interactive Inc., Ben Knight, Camilla Martin, David Martin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Drouin, Aimee)
November 29, 2011 Filing 24 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Fantasy Interactive Inc., Ben Knight, Camilla Martin, David Martin. (Drouin, Aimee)
November 18, 2011 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Andrew Katz in Opposition re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Julie Snyder. (Katz, Andrew)
November 18, 2011 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Julie Snyder. (Katz, Andrew)
October 24, 2011 Filing 20 AFFIRMATION of Aimee A. Drouin in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Fantasy Interactive Inc., Ben Knight, Camilla Martin, David Martin. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Drouin, Aimee)
October 24, 2011 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Affirmation of Service. Document filed by Fantasy Interactive Inc., Ben Knight, Camilla Martin, David Martin. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affirmation of Service)(Drouin, Aimee)
October 24, 2011 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Aimee A. Drouin in Support re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Fantasy Interactive Inc., Ben Knight, Camilla Martin, David Martin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affirmation - Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Affirmation - Camilla Martin Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2A - Exhibit A to Camilla Martin Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2B - Exhibit B to Camilla Martin Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2C - Exhibit C to Camilla Martin Affidavit, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Affirmation - Ben Knight Affidavit, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Affirmation - David Martin Affidavit, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 4A - Exhibit A to David Martin Affidavit, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 4B Part 1 - Exhibit B to David Martin Affidavit pages 1-50, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 4B Part 2 - Exhibit B to David Martin Affidavit pages 50-100, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 4B Part 3 - Exhibit B to David Martin Affidavit pages 100-157, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 4C - Exhibit C to David Martin Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Affirmation - Nicholas Saricopoulos Affidavit, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 5A to Affirmation - Exhibit A to Nicholas Saricopoulos Affidavit, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 5B to Affirmation - Exhibit B to Nicholas Saricopoulos Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 5C to Affirmation - Exhibit C to Nicholas Saricopoulos Affidavit, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 5D to Affirmation - Exhibit D to Nicholas Saricopoulos Affidavit, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 5E to Affirmation - Exhibit E to Nicholas Saricopoulos Affidavit)(Drouin, Aimee)
October 21, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Fantasy Interactive Inc., Ben Knight, Camilla Martin, David Martin. Responses due by 11/18/2011 Return Date set for 12/16/2011 at 10:00 AM.(Drouin, Aimee)
May 25, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fantasy Interactive Inc., Ben Knight, Camilla Martin, David Martin. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 7785)Document filed by Julie Snyder, Karen Gould.(ama) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/10/2011) (ae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder et al v. Fantasy Interactive Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Snyder
Represented By: Andrew Michael Katz
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Carlo Parkhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Gould
Represented By: Andrew Michael Katz
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Carlo Parkhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fantasy Interactive Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camilla Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?