Robinson v. Gucci America et al Featured Case

Josephine Robinson, a former in-house tax lawyer at Gucci sued the fashion house in federal court for racial discrimination, alleging that a barrage of racial epithets and degenerate comments were used against her by senior Gucci executives, including her boss, Stan Sherwood, the company's executive international tax counsel.

Her lawyers charge that Sherwood often discussed Robinson's skin color, told racist jokes in her presence and informed her she would receive a promotion because she is black.

Plaintiff: Josephine Robinson
Defendant: Gucci America, Stan Sherwood, Matteo Mascazzini and Christy Leleck
Case Number: 1:2011cv03742
Filed: June 1, 2011
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Bronx
Presiding Judge: William H. Pauley
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2012 27 Featured Case CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The case is to be tried to a jury. Expert Deposition due by 8/30/2012. Fact Discovery due by 7/16/2012. Expert Discovery due by 8/30/2012. The conference set for May 18, 2012 is adjourned. Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 at 11:30 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trialis 5 days, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/3/2012) (rjm) Modified on 5/4/2012 (rjm).
May 1, 2012 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Nicholas Filosa on behalf of Josephine Robinson (Filosa, Gregory)
February 10, 2012 25 ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Matteo Mascazzini.(Coyne, Michele)
January 27, 2012 24 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: #101349 for the aforementioned reasons denying re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Matteo Mascazzini. The Clerk of Court is Directed to term motion (doc. #11). (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/26/2012) (cd) Modified on 1/30/2012 (jab).
January 17, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (js)
January 17, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/17/2012. Next PTC set 5/13/2012 at 10:30 a.m. (See transcript) (js)
January 17, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/17/2012, ( Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.). (js)
January 17, 2012 23 Featured Case CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C, § 636(c). Settlement discussions have taken place. The parties have conferred pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Deposition due by 7/2/2012. Fact Discovery due by 5/16/2012. Expert Discovery due by 7/2/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/17/2012) (rjm)
December 14, 2011 22 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/17/2011 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/14/2011) (js)
December 8, 2011 20 Mediator Session Held on 12/08/2011 at 233 Broadway.(gom)
October 28, 2011 19 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matteo Mascazzini. (Coyne, Michele)
October 27, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER: In light of the fact that this case has been referred for mediation pursuant to the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program of mediation, the initial conference currently set for November 4, 2011 is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. The parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court after the mediation session is held to notify the Court of the results of the mediation and to request a conference at that time. The parties are instructed to consult the Court's Individual Practices, available at the website for the Court, http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/24/2011) (lmb)
October 27, 2011 17 MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 12/8/11 10:00 AM 233 Broadway.(gom)
October 25, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER: In light of the fact that this case has been referred for mediation pursuant to the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program of mediation, the initial conference currently set for November 4, 2011 is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. The parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court after the mediation session is held to notify the Court of the results of the mediation and to request a conference at that time. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/24/2011) (ab)
October 21, 2011 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Josephine Robinson. (Weinick, Matthew)
October 17, 2011 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 11/16/2011.(ms)
October 14, 2011 MEDIATOR EXPERTISE REQUEST Mediator to be Assigned by 10/24/2011.(gom)
October 11, 2011 14 Featured Case ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Order filed January 3, 2011). Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 10/21/2011. Mediator Expertise Request due by 10/17/2011. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 01/03/2011) (sc)
October 7, 2011 13 ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Gucci America, Christy Leleck, Stan Sherwood.(Coyne, Michele)
October 7, 2011 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matteo Mascazzini. (Coyne, Michele)
October 7, 2011 11 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Matteo Mascazzini.(Coyne, Michele)
October 3, 2011 10 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge William H. Pauley, III is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
September 22, 2011 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristina Cunard Hammond on behalf of Gucci America, Christy Leleck, Matteo Mascazzini, Stan Sherwood (Hammond, Kristina)
September 22, 2011 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Gucci North American Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Gucci Group N.V., Corporate Parent PPR for Gucci America. Document filed by Gucci America, Christy Leleck, Matteo Mascazzini, Stan Sherwood.(Coyne, Michele)
September 22, 2011 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michele Ann Coyne on behalf of Gucci America, Christy Leleck, Matteo Mascazzini, Stan Sherwood (Coyne, Michele)
September 21, 2011 6 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Matthew Weinick dated 9/14/2011 re: Accordingly, Counsel for plaintiffs request an adjournment of the initial conference to allow for defendants counsel=to appear and file an answer. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The initial conference is adjourned to November 4, 2011 at 11:30 a.m.. In addition, Plaintiffs is directed to provide an explanation in writing as to why service has not been effected by September 16, 2011. So Ordered. ( Initial Conference set for 11/4/2011 at 11:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/21/2011) (js)
September 20, 2011 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. All Defendants. Service was accepted by Michele A. Coyne, Esq.. Document filed by Josephine Robinson. (Ostrove, Rick)
September 14, 2011 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Brian Weinick on behalf of Josephine Robinson (Weinick, Matthew)
June 15, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Rick Ostrove for noncompliance with Section (14.3) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 1 Complaint to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (ama)
June 7, 2011 3 Featured Case ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/16/2011 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/7/2011) (jfe)
June 2, 2011 2 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Sir or Madame from Madeleine E. Schwartz dated 5/31/2011 re: Submission of original and 3 copies of Summons and Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: This letter and its enclosures were received after 5pm on June 1, 2011. By mistake it was not put in the appropriate time stamp machine. Thus this letter and its enclosures are to be filed as of 6/1/2011. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy (Part One) 6/2/2011) (rdz) Modified on 6/2/2011 (jar). Modified on 6/2/2011 (jar).
June 1, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
June 1, 2011 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (rdz)
June 1, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gucci America, Christy Leleck, Matteo Mascazzini, Stan Sherwood. (rdz)
June 1, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Gucci America, Christy Leleck, Matteo Mascazzini, Stan Sherwood. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401008110)Document filed by Josephine Robinson.(rdz) (ama).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Gucci America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Robinson
Represented By: Rick Ostrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gucci America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matteo Mascazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Leleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?