Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas et al v. Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O Adaly Investment Management Co. et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.
Defendant: CGM IRA Custodian, Fortis Clearing Americas LLC 695, R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Decommissioning Trust, BMO Nesbit Burns Inc./CDS, Pension Fund Association for Local Government Officials, TMS/ITS SETT A/C For HFF I LLC, CIM XVI LLC, Kurt Adler Estate, Alexander Solo Irra FBO Alexander Solon, James P. O'Shaughnessy, White Mountains Reinsurance Company Of America, Timothy R. Kennedy, Firstar Trust Company, Dreyfus Active Midcap Fund, CEDE & Co C/O Depository Trust Company, Dresdner Bank, AG, Ruth Gruenthal, Intersil Equity Inc. Fund, Jay Goldman Master LP, Sophie McConnell, T.Rowe Price Associates, Value Fund, a series of First Investors Life Series Funds, Shirley J. Sperling, Citigroup Securities Services Inc., HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L, Amici Fund International LTD, SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD U.S. Index Fund C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc., The Strategic Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., First Investors Life Series Fund Utilities Series, Nomura Securities International Inc.-Stock Lending, SS&C TECHNOLOGIES HOLDINGS, INC.;, Phoebe P. Bender, B Trade Services LLC, Commerzbank AG, Governing Council of the University of Toronto, Ian Fierstein, Reserve Fund, Strategic Opportunities Fund LTD, Goldentree Master Fund II, Ltd, Mid Atlantic Capital Corp., David Hochberg, Pension Trust Fund Local Union#27, Twin Securities, Inc., Societe Generale Asset MGMT Co, United Church of Christ Defined Contribution, T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Gabelli Asset Management Company, TD Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity, Gabelli Foundation, Inc., Nancy G. Lezette Estate, Robert A. and Jamie A. Simins JTWROS, RIEF Trading LLC, THE FRANCISCAN MISSIONARY UNION, NYC District Council Carpenters Welfare, Flexible US Equity Managers, Tensor Opportunity Limited, Barry Kupferberg David & Lori Banner Kupferberg JT TEN, Mr Violet and Mrs Leslie Payne Jtwros, Bank of Tokyo - Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Leslie Payne, Madison Square Investors Large-Cap Enhanced Index Fund LP (f/k/a NYLIM-QS Large Cap Enhanced Fund LP), Anthony Y. Lin, ANIMA SGR S.p.A, Dr. David L. Hoexter, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Dexia Bank, LaBranche & Co. LLC, The Collectors Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Dexia Bank C/O Dexia Credit Local, Gabelli Securities, Inc., Amici Associates LP, Natixis Bleichroeder LLC, Fairweather LTD PTRSHP R1F3154C Custodian, W. Milton, Jr. Trust Under Will for the Benefit of Anna Livingstone, RIEF Trading LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Board of Trustees of the Empire State Carpenters Pension Fund, Baldwin Enterprises, Inc., Cogent Management Inc., T. Rowe Price Associates (Fourlard and CO), Deleware Charter Guarantee & Trust CO., Dorothy Russell Shattuck, Carret Asset Management, New York City District Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, Brown Brothers Harriman and Company/ETF, Latigo Partners LP, Abigail Wallach, Mary K. Monopoli, Invenio Partners LP, Anna Livingstone, T.Rowe Price Balanced Fund-Large Cap Core, Arrow Distressed Securities Fund, Pension Commingle Fund, SWAPS, SBI, ABP, LYRA Capital LLC, Violet Payne, Nicholas G. Chantiles, Mario J. Gabelli Gamco Investors Inc., Value Line Income Fund, Citadel LLC, The Blackstone Group LP, Monetary Authority/ Singapore, The Trust U/A dtd by Robert Rosenberg, Cedar Grove Cemetery Association Perpetual Care, Royal Trust Corporation of Canada, TD Emerald U.S. Market Index Fund, Bram Fierstein, Marjorie Rozman, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (The Gabelli Global Multimed TR) Bruce M. Alpert, Bell Atlantic Master Trust, Helena Pai, The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd., Gabelli Funds, LLC, QVT Financial LP, T. Rowe Price Mid-Cap Value Fund, Inc., TD Emerald U.S. Market Index Fund C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc., Robert E La Blanc, Commerz Markets LLC, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn, The Rappaport Family Trust U/A dtd, Goldentree Asset Management LP, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC, UniCredit S.p.A., RBC O'Shaughnessy U.S. Value Fund, Texas Scottish Rite Hospital for Crippled Children, Putnam Lovell NBF Securities Inc., Alphadyne Asset Management LLC, Nancu G Lezette, Gabelli Value Fund, Inc., Alexandra Global Master Fund LTD, Swaps, SBI, Walker House SPV Ltd., Risk Facil 99: Close /Risk, Robeco Institutional Asset Management BV, Julia K. Rosenwald, Drawbridge Global Macro, Master Fund Ltd-K, Foulard and Co., Toro Trading LLC, George M. Moss, Goldentree Master Fund Ltd., LOMBARDI & CO., INC., Dreyfus Stock Index Funds, Inc., Jay Goldman & Co. LP, Direxion Insurance Trust, GMIMCO Trust (General Motors Investment Management Corp.), Latigo Master Fund Ltd., O' Shaugnessy, L3 Communication Corporation Master Trust, Dreyfus Index Funds, Inc., Muriel Hyman, Woodmont Investments Ltd, Lighthouse Partners LLC/ LMA SPC OBO MAP I Segrgtn Prtf C/O Lighthouse Partners LLC, Mitzuho Bank, Ltd., Hugh F. Fagan, T.Rowe Price Equity Income Trust C/O T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Dynamic Domestic Fund LP, Schultze Asset Mgmt, Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers & Grain Millers International Pension Fund, Intesa Sanpaolo, Citadel Equity Fund LTD/Leeds MGMT SVCS (Cayman) Ltd C/O Citadel Investment Group LLC, Swiss Re Financial Products Corp., HFF I LLC, Convertibles Strategic Hold, William Monopoli, Robert A. Simins, NYC District Council Carpenters Pension, Elizabeth L. Levin, Dresdner Bank, AG C/O Commerzbank AG, Charles Pratt & Company LLC, Alphadyne International Master Fund Ltd., Harvest Capital LP, Direxion Funds, Mitsubishi UFJ Asset Management LTD, T.W. W Milton Jr, Goldentree Multistrategy Offshore Fund, The Value Line Income Fund, Secretaria to Mutual Benefit Association for Tokyo Metropolitan Employees, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg C/O ABP Investments US, Inc., Amundi Investment Advisors USA, Inc., Mary Jane F. Moeller, T Rowe Price Trust CO., Mary F. Brown, Vilma L. Chantilles, Mitsubishi UFJ Asset MGMT #968364 (Through Master Trust Bank Of Japan)C/O Bank Of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Gabelli) Bruce M. Alpert, Labranche Structured Products LLC, Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., TD Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc., Harvey Bookman, TD Securities Inc., E-Connectivity AVG PX, Gabelli Equity Trust, Inc., TRE Pension EFT Account Pension Payment System, T Rowe Price Balanced Fund, Inc., John R. Polatschek TOD, Value Fund, a series of First Investors Equity Funds, The Gabelli Equity Inc. Fund, New York State Common Retirement Fund, Mizuho Trust & Banking Co. (USA), Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd., Sherbet & Co., New Eagle Holdings LLC, TD Securities S&P 500 Index Fund, Amalgamated Bank, Charles E. Hugel, Amida Capital Management LLC, U of T Master Trust C.O the Blackstone Group LP, Gabelli Funds, Inc.(Gabelli ABC Fund), Prime Broker CSSI Stock Split and Reorg Processing Account, US Trust Co. N.A., Gabelli & Company Inc., Stichting Pensionenfonds ABP C/O ABP Investments US, Inc., Fairweather Limited Partnership, Tribune Co COM STK Tender EXP, Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP, R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC, Lincoln FD Tax Advantage, Gabelli Global Deal Fund, Alexander D and Paula Solon JTWROS, Cheetah & Co., ABN AMRO Clearing Chicago LLC, Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc., T.Rowe Price Associates (Sherbet+Co), Instinet Corp NY, Alexander Solon Irra FBO Alexander Solon C/O MLPF&S Cust FPO, Ernest W. Michel, Schultze Asset Management, LLC, U.S. Shares Programs, Jill Kaplin, Elizabeth De Cuevas, Quintessence Fund, LP, Charter Partners LP, Bakery CONF TOB WRKS Local 102, Thomas J. Majorana, CGM IRA Custodian, Tocqueville Asset Management L.P., Gryphon Hidden Values VIII LTD, Caxton Associates LP, Micah Fierstein Gen Par, Martha Pope, Citadel Equity Fund Ltd., Pacific Select Fund, Spinningrod & Co., E*Trade Clearing LLC, DBSO Securities Ltd., Anima Societa DI Gestione Del Risparmio Per Azioni, Lighthouse Partners, LLC, T. Rowe Price Equity Income Fund, Portfolio 1 Offshore Master LP LSV C/O GS & CO, Tribune CO COM STK Tender EXP, Tensor Opportunity Limited C/O M. Safra & Co. Inc., Mount Ararat Cemetery, Inc., White Mountains RE Bermuda Ltd C/O White Mountains Reinsurance Company of America, T. Rowe Price Equity Series, Inc., Mutual of America Investment Corp., Amici Qualified Associates, Anima Societa' Di Gestione C/O BPM Capital Trust GSS LLC, University of Toronto C/O the Blackstone Group LP, Himan Brown, Robeco Investment Management, Inc., Robert E. LaBlanc, Societe General Asset Management, Porter Orlin LLC, Gamco Investors Inc., Goldentree Master Fund Ltd. C/O Golden Tree Asset Management LP, Gamco Asset Management Inc., Havens Partners Enhanced Fund, L.P., Leavitt J. Pope Estate, Geraldo Rivera, Lori Banner Kupferberg, Stichting Pensioenfonds Van de C/O ABP Investments US, Inc., Loeb Arbitrage Management LP, Stichting Pensioenfonds VAN DE ABN AMRO N.V., IBEW Local 25 Master Trust Plan, Binhua Mao, Citi Goldentree, LTD, Dreyfus Basic S&P 500 Stock Index Fund, Jesse Werthman, Multi-Strategy Greenock Master Fund Ltd, Dr. David L. Hoexter IRA R/O, Dennis S. Bunder, Stichting Pensionenfonds OCE C/O ABO Investments US, Inc., Himan Brown Revocable Trust, ysteia Capital Management C/O Amundi Investments Advisors USA, Inc., William J. Brown, Sterne Agee & Leach Inc., Jonathan A. Knee, Paul Pai & Helena Pai Joint Tenant, Intersil Equity Income Fund, Epstein Family Revocable Trust, Evergreen Asset Management C/O Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., QVT Fund, QES QVT Fund LP, Homeland and Insurance Company of New York, Susan J Martin JT Ten, Alexander D Jtwros, Spear Leeds and Kellogg, Madison Square Large-Cap Enhanced Index Fund LP, Homeland and Insurance Company Of New York C/O One Beacon Insurance Co., M&T Bank, Leeda Management Services (Cayman) LTD, Mitsubishi UFJ, Kellogg Shierley J Sperling, T.D. Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity Pooled Fund Trust, BMO Nesbit Burns Trading Corp. SA, Institutional Benchmarks Series (Master Feeder) Limited C/O LYRA Capital LLC, Gurdon H. Metz, Gabelli Funds, Inc., William Sanderson Twaddell, R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Deommissioning Trust, Manufacturers & Traders Trust Co., New York Estate Teacher's Retirement System, Tensor Opportunity Limited C. O M., TD Emerald Pooled U.S. Fund C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc., Strategic Funds, Inc., Anchin Block & Anchin, Havens Partners, L.P., Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd., Towerview LLC, Joan E. Clark, LMA SPC for and on Behalf of MAP I Segregated Portfolio, Barry David Kupferberg, ITG Inc., Mario J. Gabelli, Equity League Pension Trust Fund, ABP Investments US, Inc., Robert M. Treboux, Micah Fierstein, ASB Advisors LLC, Spear Leeds, FBO Anna Livingstone, Nanette Rosenberg, MLPF & S Cust FPO, R.E. Ginna Qualified Decommissioning Trust, Clearwater Investment Trust, Jerome & Maria Markowitz JTWROS, Taskforce & Co., Kellog Capital Markets LLC, T.Rowe Price Equity Index 500 Fund, Dr. Peter Fairweather, Dreyfus S&P 500 ST INDX FD, Alson Cap Partners LLC/ Alson Signature FD Offshore M&C Corporate Services Ltd., New Eagle Holdings LLC Risk Arbitrage, Citi Golden Tree Ltd. C/O Golden Tree Asset Management LP, Mary Jane F. Moeller Trust U/A/D, Folksamerica Reinsurance Company, GSS LLC, Emanuel E. Geduld 2005 Family Trust, Archdiocese Of New York Master Trust, Westchester Capital Management, Condor C/O Robeco Inst Asset MGMT BV C/O Robeco Investment Management, Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., T. Rowe Price Trust Co., Delaware Charter G & T TTEE, Elaine Cheah-Richert, GMIMCO Trust (General Motors) Bruce Marquand, Defendants' Executive Committee, SS&C Technologies, Inc., EAC Partners Master Fund LTD, Depository Trust Company, BMO Nesbitt Burns Trading Corp. SA, Susan J. Martin, Hearst Equity Appreciation Plan, TRPTC TTEE Intersil Equity Inc. Fund, T. Rowe Price Associates C/O CT Corporation, Mergers INVTMT TRD, Hudson Bay Fund LP, Capitalia Asset Management SGR S.P.A., T. Rowe Price Trust Company, Bessemer Trust Company, Legg Mason Partners, Systeia Capital Management C/O, Christian Brothers Investment Services, Inc., Arnold Manheimer, Stichting Pensioenfonds Hoogovens, John G. Kologi, John J. and Rosemary Wagner JTWROS, T/W W Milton Jr FBO Anna Livingstone, Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Iolaire Investors LLP, T.Rowe Price Associates (Cheetah+Co), M. Safra & Co., Inc., BPM Capital Trust, MACM 8, Capitalia Azionario USA, Adaly Opportunity Fund, L.P., Gaqbelli AVG Price 2, Jamie A. Simins Jtwros, Capitalia Azionario USA C/O Capitalia AM SGR SPA C/O Unicredit S.P.A., 11A SPX1, ABP, Newedge USA, LLC, Equity Clearing Division, Eric D. Werthman, Vester Hughes, Goldentree Multistrategy Offshore Fund C/O Golden Tree Asset Management LP, Helen Buttenwieser Trust, Emanuel Gruss, GDK INC., Bruce Marquand, Fideuram Bank Luxembourg S.A. C/O Intesa Sanpaolo, Ian Fierstein Gen Par, Fredric Levenson, Government Of Singapore Investment Corp PTE LTD, Jesse Fierstein Gen Par, Strategic Opportunity, Jefferies & Company, Inc., TD Emerald Pooled U.S. Fund, Cara Leigh Gilespie-Wilson, T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. (Foulard and Co), Cougar Trading, LLC, T. Rowe Price Associates (Spinningrod & Co), Systeia Capital Management, Trinity Derivatives Group LLC, Rosemary Wagner, CBS Master Trust, Paula Solon Jtwros, Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd., MB Financial Bank, N.A., D E Shaw Valence Portfolio LLC, GS&CO, Shirley J Sperling and Susan J Martin JT Ten, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Jerome Markowitz, Michael Loeb, Traits Omni, QVT Fund LP, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Th Gabelli Equity INC FD) Bruce M. Alpert, Blue Chip Fund, a series of First Investors Life Series Funds, BMO Nesbit Burns Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Does 1-5,000, Paul Pai, DEPFA Bank PLC, CEDE & Co.,, Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd. Trustee, Stichting Pensioenfonds OCE, Cara Leigh Gillespie-Wilson, Neuberger Berman Inc., Strategic Opportunity BMO Nesbitt Burns C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., Malcolm McConnell, New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, RBC O'Shaughnessy Canadian Equity Fund, John Doe, Adaly Investment Management Co., St. Francis Friends of the Poor, Inc., T. Rowe Price Balanced Fund, Inc. (incorrectly named as "T. Rowe Price Balanced Fund - Large Cap Core"), Alexander D. Solon, Royal Bank of Canada, Capitalia AM SGR SPA, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Gabelli Funds Inc.) Bruce M. Alpert, Maria Markowitz, NYLIM-QS Large Cap Enhanced Fund LP, Bram Fierstein Gen Par, Consolidated Edison Of NY K801, LP Ma1 Ltd., Institutional Benchmarks Series (Master Feeder) Limited, Fairweather Family L.P., Mutual of America Investment Corp. Equity Index Fund, RIEF RMP LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, Dreyfus S&P 500 Stock Index Fund, Value Line Inc., Robert Mosberg, Evolution All-Cap Equity Fund, Mutual of America Capital Management Corp., T.Rowe Price Associates (Taskforce & Co), Gabelli Funds, Inc. (The Gabelli Asset Fund) Bruce M. Alpert, Scott R. Klarquist, Pond View Credit (Master) L.P., Jesse Fierstein, Ciri Gillispie, Thomas J. Majorana, Evergreen Asset Management Corp., 1IA SPX1, EAC Management LP, Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd., Local 102 Pension/NO TR VAL IM, Goldentree Multistrategy LTD, Paris Trading, University of Toronto Master Trust, Robert A. Simins Jtwors, DELOS Insurance Company, Clearwater Investment, Renaissance Technologies LLC, IBEW Local 25 Retirement Funds Master Trust, Jamie A. Simins, New York City Deferred Compensation Plan, Pacific Select, Fordham University, Anima Societa DI Gestione, TD U.S. Large Cap Value Fund C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc., Alson Signature Fund Offshore Portfolio, Ltd, The Elizabeth L. Levin 2006 SZ-2 Year Grantor Retained Annuity Trust under Agreement Dated, TD U.S. Large Cap Value Fund, Value Line Asset Management, TRE Pension Eft Acct PPS, Rabo Capital Services, Inc., First Investors Utilities Income, T. Rowe Price Index Trust, Inc., TR UA Himan Brown Revocable Trust, Swiss American Securities Inc., Iglesia Metodista Del Peru, Empire State Carpenters Pension, Margaret T.M. Jones CP & CO AC, TD U.S. Index Fund, Newedge USA, LLC, Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers & Grain Millers Union Local 102, Lawrence B. Buttenwieser, Esq., Lyxor Alphadyne, SPC, The New York Province of the Society of Jesus, Dorothy A. Levenson, Edith A. Ehrlich, Lenox Hill Hospital, T.Rowe Price Total Equity Market Index Fund, Sandelman Partners Multi-Strategy Master Fund, LTD, GMIMCO Trust, RBC Global Asset Management Inc., Investment Tech Group Inc., Safra & Co. Inc., FERRIS TRADING FUND LLC, Alson Capital Partners, LLC, Polly H. Howells, Himan Brown, TR UA Himan Brown Revocable Trust, Vilma L Chantilles JT Ten, Elizabeth H. Vanmerkensteijn, Millenco LLC, Greenock Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd., Master Trust Bank of Japan LTD, TD Asset Management USA Inc., James F. Hoge, Jr., Mary Lou Ricotta, Flexible US Equity Managers Portfolio 1 LLC, Monetary Authority of Singapore, Alexander Solon, Gabelli Average Price 2, Dreyfus/Laurel Funds Inc, The Merger Fund, The Trust U/A dtd by Michael Rosenberg, Dexia Credit Local, New York Branch, Martha P. Pope, Matthew Bender IV, First Investors Life Series Fund Blue Chip Series, Fideuram Bank Luxembourg S.A., Mutual Of Amer Life Ins COA/C Equity-Index Fund, Fierstein Company, New York State Insurance Fund, Everest Re Group Ltd., Paula Solon, Stephen R. Manheimer, SPX Principal Strategy U.S. Shares Programs, O'Shaughnessy Asset Management, LLC, BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc./CDS, T. Rowe Price Equity Income Trust and R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Carol E Newman, Twin Securities Inc., Cutler Group, LP, Wabash/Harvest Partners LP, New Americans LLC, Harvest AA Capital LP, Blue Chip Fund, a series of First Investors Equity Funds, Cassandra Trading Group LLC and TD Securities, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv04784
Filed: July 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Referring Judge: Richard J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 907 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8202 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter, filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wilmington Trust Company, Marc S. Kirschner, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Amy Christine Brown and Hal Neier terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
October 28, 2019 Filing 906 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8195 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court shall close these cases. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
August 22, 2019 Filing 905 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leo V. Gagion on behalf of New York Estate Teacher's Retirement System, New York State Common Retirement Fund, New York State Insurance Fund. (Gagion, Leo)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 904 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Reference is hereby made to the Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by FisherBroyles LLP in the above-referenced cases at Docket Entries 8038 (In Re: Tribune Company Fraudulent Conveyance Litigation 11-md-2296-DLC), 471 (Niese el al. v. Alliance Bernstein L.P. el al., 11-cv-4538-DLC), and 902 (Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas el al. v. Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. c/o Adaly Investment Management Co., el al., 11-cv-4784-DLC) whereby FisherBroyles LLP entered its appearance as counsel for Mizuho Trust & Banking Company (USA) (n/k/a Mizuho Bank (USA)) ("Mizuho") and the law firm of Troutman Sanders LLP withdrew as counsel of record for Mizuho. The Court having reviewed the Notice of Substitution of Counsel, said substitution of counsel is hereby SO ORDERED. Attorney Hollace Topol Cohen for Mizuho Trust & Banking Co. (USA),Hollace Topol Cohen for Mizuho Trust & Banking Co., Ltd. Hollace Topol Cohen for Mizuho Trust & Banking Co. (USA), Hollace Topol Cohen for Mizuho Trust & Banking Co (USA), added. Attorney Matthew Joel Aaronson terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:11-cv-04538-DLC, 1:11-cv-04784-DLC(jca)
July 17, 2019 Filing 903 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Mizuho Trust & Banking Co. (USA). Related Document Number: #902 . (Cohen, Hollace)
May 8, 2019 Filing 902 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Matthew J. Aaronson, New Attorney: Hollace Topol Cohen, Address: FisherBroyles, LLP, 445 Park Avenue, 9th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10022, 9173654871. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 1:11-cv-04538-DLC, 1:11-cv-04784-DLC(Cohen, Hollace)
February 28, 2019 Filing 901 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [6047 in 12-cv-2652-DLC] MOTION for Nicholas M. Kelley to Withdraw as Attorney For Defendant W.L. Putnam Prize Fund. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Nicolas M. Kelley terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 900 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7770 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 5/15/2020.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
February 7, 2019 Filing 899 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:11-cv-04522-DLC; granting (7746) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Evan Robert Schnittman terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al. (jca)
January 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 31, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 30, 2019 Filing 898 DECLARATION of Evan Schnittman in Support re: (296 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 233 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03753-DLC, 201 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 122 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 303 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03750-DLC, 6019 in 1:12-cv-02652-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 405 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 259 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 7746 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 230 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 298 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 374 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03738-DLC, 121 in 1:12-cv-06055-DLC, 194 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 282 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 211 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 175 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03752-DLC, 259 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 166 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 342 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03747-DLC, 246 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03739-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-03737-DLC, 130 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 149 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 855 in 1:12-cv-00064-DLC, 286 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 678 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 134 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 66 in 1:13-cv-03744-DLC, 61 in 1:13-cv-03743-DLC, 897 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 114 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 208 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03741-DLC, 162 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03748-DLC, 141 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 225 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03742-DLC, 290 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03749-DLC, 220 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03746-DLC, 298 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 218 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 264 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 186 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03751-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 129 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 465 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 261 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 163 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 140 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 190 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03745-DLC, 125 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 152 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 386 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03740-DLC, 187 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03736-DLC) MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody.. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 897 MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
January 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Pretrial Conference held on 1/14/2019. (Court Reporter Kristen Carannante) Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER: A pretrial conference is scheduled for January 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street. The Court has received requests from counsel to participate in the conference by telephone. Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED that any party wishing to be heard at the conference must appear in person. Parties wishing only to listen to the conference by telephone may do so by calling (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 7185839. Overflow seating will be available in Courtroom 12B. Parties may order a transcript of the conference by contacting Southern District Reporters. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 895 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Robert Schnittman on behalf of ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 894 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (5939 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 893 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 7643 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 461 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 110 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS) Notice of Substitution of Attorney, filed by SG Americas Securities, LLC, SG Americas Securities LLC. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Alan Joseph Stone for Newedge LLC, USA,Alan Joseph Stone for Newedge USA, LLC,Alan Joseph Stone for Newedge USA, LLC,Alan Joseph Stone for Newedge USA, LLC,Alan Joseph Stone for Newedge USA, LLC Alan Joseph Stone for Newedge USA, LLC, Alan Joseph Stone for Newedge USA, LLC, Alan Joseph Stone for Newedge USA, LLC, Alan Joseph Stone for Newedge USA, LLC, added. Attorney Harry Frischer and Stephen Leonard Ratner terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 1:12-cv-04539-RJS(ne)
October 24, 2018 Filing 893 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Stephen Leonard Ratner, New Attorney: Alan J. Stone, Address: Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, New York, USA 10005, 212-530-5285. Document filed by SG Americas Securities LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Stone, Alan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 892 MOTION for Matthew J. Latterner to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The Bank of Nova Scotia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Latterner, Matthew)
September 24, 2018 Filing 891 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Joseph Stone on behalf of The Bank of Nova Scotia. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Stone, Alan)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 890 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (456) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Asa Robison Danes terminated in case 1:11-cv-04538-RJS; granting (889) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Asa Robison Danes terminated in case 1:11-cv-04784-RJS; granting (7600) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Asa Robison Danes terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS; granting (671) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Asa Robison Danes terminated in case 1:11-cv-09572-RJS; granting (5897) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Asa Robison Danes terminated in case 1:12-cv-02652-RJS. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/13/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS (ne)
August 10, 2018 Filing 889 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Asa R. Danes to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by NICHOLAS H. WERTHMAN, Polly H. Howells, Eric D. Werthman, Jesse Werthman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS(Danes, Asa) Modified on 8/14/2018 (db).
June 7, 2018 Filing 888 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Tom Van Arsdel, New Attorney: James Andrew Hinds, Jr. . Document filed by Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. aka JC Clark Adaly Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Hinds, James)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 887 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7367 in case 11-md-2296) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCES OF DAVID S. MORDKOFF AND REMOVAL FROM ELECTRONIC SERVICE LIST. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney David Steve Mordkoff terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al. (ras) Modified on 4/25/2018 (ras).
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 886 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (874) Letter Motion to Substitute Attorney in case 1:11-cv-04784-RJS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Stephen J. Brown is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. Attorney Stephen Joseph Brown terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS (mro)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 885 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting (7338) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paul Matthew Fakler terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS; granting (451) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paul Matthew Fakler terminated in case 1:11-cv-04538-RJS; granting (883) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paul Matthew Fakler terminated in case 1:11-cv-04784-RJS. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/02/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS (ama)
March 29, 2018 Filing 884 AFFIRMATION of Paul M. Fakler in Support re: (883 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS) MOTION for Paul M. Fakler to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd., Blackport Capital Fund Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Fakler, Paul)
March 29, 2018 Filing 883 MOTION for Paul M. Fakler to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd., Blackport Capital Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Fakler, Paul)
March 15, 2018 Filing 882 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell T. Gorkin on behalf of Dreyfus Stock Index Funds, Inc.. (Gorkin, Russell)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 881 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (880) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (7266) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Attorney D. Ross Martin terminated in case 1:11-cv-04784-RJS. Attorney D. Ross Martin terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that D. Ross Martin is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in these actions and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/6/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS. (ras)
March 5, 2018 Filing 880 MOTION for D. Ross Martin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Stichting Pensioenfonds Hoogovens, Stichting Pensioenfonds OCE, Stichting Pensioenfonds VAN DE ABN AMRO N.V., Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Martin, D.)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 879 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED THIS 6TH DAY OF February, 2018. (Attorney Leo George Kailas for MATTHEW BENDER IV, Leo George Kailas for MATTHEW BENDER IV FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Leo George Kailas for PHOEBE P BENDER Leo George Kailas for Phoebe P. Bender, Leo George Kailas for Matthew Bender IV, Leo George Kailas for MATTHEW BENDER IV, Leo George Kailas for MATTHEW BENDER IV FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Leo George Kailas for PHOEBE P BENDER, added.) (Attorney Robert Allen Meister terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/6/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS. (ras)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 878 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Stephen Davis terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/5/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS. (ras)
November 16, 2017 Filing 877 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Withdraw papers served on Trinity Derivatives Group, LLC on September 6, 2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Trinity Derivatives Group LLC. (Rasey, Randall)
November 16, 2017 Filing 876 DECLARATION of Randall L. Rasey in Support re: #875 MOTION for Randall L. Rasey to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Trinity Derivatives Group LLC. (Rasey, Randall)
November 16, 2017 Filing 875 MOTION for Randall L. Rasey to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Trinity Derivatives Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rasey, Randall)
November 15, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Randall l Rasey to RE-FILE Document #872 MOTION for Randall L. Rasey to Withdraw as Attorney . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
September 22, 2017 Filing 874 FIRST MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Stephen J. Brown, New Attorney: James J. Veneruso . Document filed by Ian Fierstein, Jesse Fierstein, Micah Fierstein, Bram Fierstein, Fierstein Company.(Curto, Joseph)
September 6, 2017 Filing 873 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Withdraw served on Trinity Derivatives Group, LLC on 9/6/17. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Trinity Derivatives Group LLC. (Rasey, Randall)
September 6, 2017 Filing 872 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Randall L. Rasey to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Trinity Derivatives Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Randall L. Rasey in Support of Motion to Withdraw, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Rasey, Randall) Modified on 11/15/2017 (ldi).
April 26, 2017 Filing 871 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Paul Del Mauro on behalf of Delaware Charter G & T TTEE, Deleware Charter Guarantee & Trust CO.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Del Mauro, Steven)
August 1, 2016 Filing 870 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Del Guercio on behalf of Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Del Guercio, Anthony)
August 1, 2016 Filing 869 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Del Guercio on behalf of Everest Re Group Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Del Guercio, Anthony)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 868 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (223 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 184 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 204 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 867 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 358 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS) Letter re: Withdrawal of Counsel, filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou; James Philip Chou and James Philip Chou terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/25/2015) (kko)
August 25, 2015 Filing 867 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from David M. Zensky dated August 25, 2015 re: Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zensky, David)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: On this day came for consideration the motion to withdraw the appearance as counsel of Michael B. de Leeuw. Having considered the motion, the Court finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that: Michael B. de Leeuw is permitted to withdraw as counsel for defendants Drawbridge Global Macro Master Fund Ltd-K, M. Safra & Co., Inc., and Tensor Opportunity Limited C. O M. in Case No. 11-md-2296 (RJS) and Case No. 11-cv-04784 (RJS). Attorney Michael B. de Leeuw terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(mro)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 865 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between undersigned counsel and pursuant to Local Rule 1.4 of the Uni ted States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, that defendant ANIMA SGR S.p.A. hereby substitutes Cozen O'Connor as its attorney of record in place of Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP. All notices given or required to be given. and all papers filed or served or required to be filed or served in the above captioned matter, should henceforth be provided to and served upon counsel at the address set forth below: Joseph Dever, COZEN O'CONNOR, 45 Broadway, 16th Floor, New York, New York 10006, Telephone: 212-453-3916, Facsimile: 917-521-5875, Email: jdever@cozcn.com. Attorney Joseph Patrick Dever, Jr for Anima SGR S.p.A. Joseph Patrick Dever for ANIMA SGR S.p.A, added. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/9/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(mro)
April 8, 2015 Filing 864 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: David B. Hennes of Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP, New Attorney: Joseph Dever of Cozen O'Connor, Address: Cozen O'Connor, 45 Broadway, 16th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10006, (212) 453-3916. Document filed by ANIMA SGR S.p.A. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Substitution of Counsel to be so ordered)(Dever, Joseph)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 863 ORDER in case 1:11-cv-04522-RJS; granting (6483) Letter Application to Change Attorney Name on Roll. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al. (ajs)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 862 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Alexander R. Bilus for Defendants Caxton Associates LP; Clearwater Investment; Clearwater Investment Trust; Jay Goldman & Co. LP; Jay Goldman Master LP; Pacific Select; Pacific Select Fund; and Woodmont Investments Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/5/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(mro) Modified on 12/9/2014 (mro).
November 21, 2014 Filing 861 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Todd Steinberg on behalf of Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Clearwater Investment Trust, Jay Goldman & Co. LP, Jay Goldman Master LP, Pacific Select, Pacific Select Fund, Woodmont Investments Ltd. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Steinberg, Stuart)
November 21, 2014 Filing 860 SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Monica K. Hinman on June 27, 2013 . Document filed by Monika K HinmanFiled In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Martin, Brendon)
September 18, 2014 Filing 859 NOTICE of Submission of Letter. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust). (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zensky, David)
July 24, 2014 Filing 858 NOTICE of (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record and Proposed Order). Document filed by LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC, Jerome Markowitz, Maria Markowitz. (Grossman, Melanie)
June 20, 2014 Filing 857 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Lawrence Penaro on behalf of LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC, Jerome Markowitz, Maria Markowitz. (Penaro, Steven)
May 30, 2014 Filing 855 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Paul H. Cohen re: #718 Notice of Appearance. Document filed by Vester Hughes, Texas Scottish Rite Hospital for Crippled Children. (Farina, Gabrielle)
May 30, 2014 Filing 854 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabrielle Elise Farina on behalf of Vester Hughes, Texas Scottish Rite Hospital for Crippled Children. (Farina, Gabrielle)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 856 SUPPLEMENTAL CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION ANDPROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 853 ORDER: Named Defendants Counsel may make any or all of its eleven proposed motions to dismiss, so long as the initial briefs are limited to a combined 250 pages. These initial briefs shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 23, 2014. The response briefs shall also be limited to a combined 250 pages, and shall be submitted no later than Monday, June 23, 2014. The reply briefs, if any, shall be limited to a combined 100 pages, and shall be submitted no later than Thursday, July 3, 2014. Shareholder Liaison Counsel is directed to file its proposed global motion to dismiss Count 1 on behalf of all 5,200 Shareholder Defendants. The initial brief shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 23, 2014, and shall be no longer than 40 pages. The response brief shall be submitted no later than Monday, June 23, 2014, and shall be no longer than 40 pages. The reply brief, if any, shall be submitted no later than Thursday, July 3, 2014, and shall be no longer than 15 pages. ( Motions due by 5/23/2014. Responses due by 6/23/2014. Replies due by 7/3/2014.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 852 PROTECTIVE ORDER IN AID OF MEDIATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... The Court shall retain jurisdiction to interpret and enforce this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
March 13, 2014 Filing 851 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: BAILEY, KELLEHER & JOHNSON, P.C. hereby withdraws as counsel and Pedowitz & Meister, LLP is new counsel for defendants Matthew Bender, IV, Phoebe Bender and Matthew Bender, IV FamilyLimited Partnership. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(cd)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 850 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on (842 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 4586 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS) Notice (Other), Notice OF WITHDRAWAL filed by Matthew Bender IV, Phoebe P. Bender. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(cd)
March 7, 2014 Filing 849 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jennifer Lynn Zordani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9431269. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cassandra Trading Group LLC, Cutler Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zordani, Jennifer) Modified on 3/7/2014 (wb).
February 28, 2014 Filing 848 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leland H. Chait on behalf of B H Gerald Rogers MD Ltd Employee Pension Trust U/A 07/01/84, B H Gerald Rogers, Trustee, Mary Sutliffe Loucks Trust Portfolio 835, Mary Sutliffe Loucks, Trustee, Ralph Loucks Trust, Ralph B Loucks, Trustee, Robert B Greene Jr Trust U/A 11/06/86, Robert B Greene Jr, Trustee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Chait, Leland)
February 28, 2014 Filing 847 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Clorfeine on behalf of Sempra Energy Pension Master Trust, Sempra Energy, Trustee, Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Clorfeine, Sabina)
February 28, 2014 Filing 846 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kurt E Wilson on behalf of Warren J. Eide. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Wilson, Kurt)
February 27, 2014 Filing 845 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Clorfeine on behalf of SDG&E Nuc Facilities NQ CPUC Decom Master Trust For Songs, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Clorfeine, Sabina)
February 27, 2014 Filing 844 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Boos on behalf of Okabena US Core Equity Fund, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Boos, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2014 (lb).
February 27, 2014 Filing 843 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Boos on behalf of David R. Coggins, Jr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Boos, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2014 (lb).
February 26, 2014 Filing 842 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance and Requst for Removal from ECF Service re: (4553 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS) Notice of Substitution of Attorney, (4552 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS) Notice of Substitution of Attorney,. Document filed by Phoebe P. Bender, Matthew Bender IV. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Kelleher, Nannette)
February 13, 2014 Filing 841 MOTION for Richard J. Leamy, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9354696. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Leamy, Richard)
February 5, 2014 Filing 840 MOTION for Brian E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CATHOLIC UNITED INVESTMENT TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Martin, Brian)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 839 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re: (3174 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 838 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS) Notice of Substitution of Attorney, filed by Tower View LLC. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/15/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(ama) Modified on 1/31/2014 (ama).
December 20, 2013 Filing 838 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Stephanie G. Wheeler, New Attorney: David K. Momborquette, Address: Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP, 919 Third Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10022, 212-756-2286. Document filed by Towerview LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Wheeler, Stephanie)
December 10, 2013 Filing 837 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Eric David Madden on behalf of BLACK DIAMOND ARBITRAGE OFFSHORE LTD. F/K/A BLACK DIAMOND ARBITRAGE OFFSHORE LDC, Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore LDC, Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore Ltd., Black Diamond Offshore Ltd., Carlson Capital LP. New Address: Reid Collins & Tsai LLP, 1601 Elm Street, Ste. 4900, Dallas, Texas, USA 75201, 214-420-8900. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Madden, Eric)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 836 ORDER: The Court having considered the motion seeking leave, pursuant to Local Rule lA, for Scott Cameron Kessenick to withdraw as counsel for the following named Defendants in the above-referenced Action: Amida Capital Management LLC;Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd;Amida Partners Master Fund/Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC;Caxton Associates LP;Clearwater Investment;Clearwater Investment Trust;Jay Goldman & Co. LP; Jay Goldman Master LP;Pacific Select;Pacific Select Fund;Walker House SPY Ltd; and Woodmont Investments Ltd. And it appearing to the Court that the relief requested is appropriate,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Scott Cameron Kessenick is granted leave to withdraw from his representation of the above named Defendants in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/6/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(js)
December 5, 2013 Filing 835 MOTION for Scott Cameron Kessenick to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion of Withdraw of Counsel. Document filed by Amida Capital Management LLC, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Clearwater Investment Trust, Jay Goldman & Co. LP, Jay Goldman Master LP, Pacific Select, Pacific Select Fund, Walker House SPV Ltd., Woodmont Investments Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Doluisio, Michael)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 834 MASTER CASE ORDER NO.4: For the purpose of facilitating the efficient administration of these cases, including the preparation of a protocol for the future consideration of additional pre-answer motions to dismiss ("Phase Two Motions"), I and the Court having received submissions from Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel and Defendants' Liaison Counsel (after consultation with their Executive Committees) previously designated herein, it is further set forth within this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(rsh)
November 19, 2013 Filing 833 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE. by Joseph F. Kun. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(sc)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Rachel Sims dated 10/15/2013 re: Accordingly, I respectfully request that I be removed from the Court's electronic filing notifications for this action. I have been informed by the court clerk that I am required to make this application by letter to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ama)
October 9, 2013 Filing 831 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Douglas J. Smillie, New Attorney: Kevin Kennedy, Address: Blake Kirchner, Symonds Larson, Kennedy and Smith, 535 Griswold, Suite 1432, Detroit, Michigan, USA 48226, 313-961-7321. Document filed by Timothy R. Kennedy. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Smillie, Douglas)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 830 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Eugene J. Geekie, Jr. of the law firm of Freeborn & Peters LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendants Charles T. Brumback, Kimberly C. Brumback and Brumback Family, LLC, replacing Jeffrey David Eaton, Susan P. Persichilli and Louis T. DeLucia, of the law firm of Schiff Hardin LLP, who hereby withdraw as counsel of record for the heretofore named Defendants and shall have no further responsibility in this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/07/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ama)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 829 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISPLACEMENT OF COUNSEL: the Motion is GRANTED and it is hereby ORDERED that David B. Hennes shall be substituted for Michael B. de Leeuw as attorney of record for the Moving Defendants in the above-captioned matters and Mr. de Leeuw shall be removed from service of any further pleadings or papers in connection with these actions. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/03/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(ama)
September 27, 2013 Filing 828 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated September 23, 2013, the Court concludes that Section 546(e) does not preempt the Individual Creditors SLCFC claims, but that Section 362(a)(1) nonetheless deprives the Individual Creditors of standing to avoid the same transactions that the Committee is simultaneously suing to avoid; Defendants motion to dismiss is therefore granted; accordingly, the cases listed in Exhibit A of the Memorandum and Order dated September 23, 2013 and this judgment are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/27/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ml)
August 23, 2013 Filing 827 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
August 23, 2013 Filing 826 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
August 16, 2013 Filing 825 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5)(Doniak, Christine)
August 16, 2013 Filing 824 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Geoffrey Belzer,Esq., New Attorney: Joshua A. Zielinski, Esq., Address: McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP, 88 Pine Street, 24th floor, New York, New York, United States 10005, 212-483-9490. Document filed by Deleware Charter Guarantee & Trust CO.. (Zielinski, Joshua)
July 31, 2013 Filing 823 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 822 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 821 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 820 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Schedule of Avoidance Actions))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 12, 2013 Filing 819 NOTICE of Letter. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 818 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a Settlement Agreement, dated April 24, 2013 between the parties, hereby give notice that they are dismissing the actions listed below with prejudice solely against the corresponding defendant listed below: Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust v. Dennis J. Fitzsimons,et al., Case No. 12 cv 2652 (RJS), with respect to Count XIII only (Count One in the proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, which is attached as Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaints Under Rule 15, 11 MD 2296, [Docket No. 2565]) MONETARY AUTHORITY OF SINGAPORE. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et at. v. Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O A daly Investment Management Co., et al., Case No. 11-cv-04784 (RJS),MONETARY AUTHORITY OF SINGAPORE. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/10/2013) (ama)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 817 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a Settlement Agreement, dated November 29, 2012 between the parties, hereby give notice that they are dismissing the actions listed below with prejudice solely against the corresponding defendant listed below: Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust v. Dennis J. Fitzsimons,et al., Case No. 12 cv 2652 (RJS), with respect to Count Xlll only (Count One in the proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, which is attached as Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaints Under Rule 15, 11 MD 2296, [Docket No. 2565]) THE LINCOLN FUND TAX ADVANTAGED LP. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al. v. Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc.C/0 Adaly Investment Management Co., et al., Case No. 11-cv-04784 (RJS), THE LINCOLN FUND TAX ADVANTAGED LP. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS(ama)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 816 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1) and paragraph 13 of Master Case Order No. 3 [Docket No. 1395], Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively,the "Note Holder Plaintiffs") hereby give notice that they have dismissed the action listed below without prejudice solely against defendant Mitsubishi UFJ ("Defendant"), who has neither moved nor answered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/08/2013) (ama)
July 8, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Joseph Aronauer Document #814 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Richard J. Sullivan for approval. (jno)
July 3, 2013 Filing 815 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE served on MITSUBISHI UFJ on July 3, 2013. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Owens, Ronald)
July 3, 2013 Filing 814 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) Mitsubishi UFJ. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Aronauer, Joseph) Modified on 7/8/2013 (jno).
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 813 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively, the "Note Holder Plaintiffs"), hereby dismiss this action against defendant Value Line, Inc., who has neither moved nor answered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/26/2013) (ama)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 812 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a Settlement Agreement, dated November 15,2012 between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively, the "Note Holder Plaintiffs") and Plaintiff Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust (the "Trustee," and together with the Note Holder Plaintiffs, the "Plaintiffs"), hereby give notice that they are dismissing the actions listed below with prejudice solely against the corresponding defendant listed below:Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust v. Dennis J. Fitzsimons, et at., Case No. 12 cv 2652 (RJS), with respect to Count XIII only (Count One in the proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, which is attached as Tab 1 to the Letter to Judge Sullivan dated May 17,2013 (11 MD 2296, Docket No. 2522) RUTH G RUENTHAL Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al. v. Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., et al., Case No. 11-cv-047S4 (RJS), RUTH GRUENTHAL. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/26/2013) (ama)
June 26, 2013 Filing 811 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Towerview LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Momborquette, David)
June 20, 2013 Filing 810 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Towerview LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Blase, Kristie)
June 20, 2013 Filing 809 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Keith Momborquette on behalf of Towerview LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Momborquette, David)
June 20, 2013 Filing 808 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Hayward Gussman, Jr on behalf of Towerview LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(Gussman, William)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 807 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND ORDER: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that as of the close of business on May 31,2013, Mark E. Klein will no longer be employed by the Office of the Attorney General of the State of New York and, accordingly, hereby withdraws as counsel for Defendant New York State Common Retirement Fund in the above-captioned action, and requests that his appearance herein be terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS(ama)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 806 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND ORDER: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that as of the close of business on May 31, 2013, Mark E. Klein will no longer be employed by the Office of the Attorney General of the State of New York and, accordingly, hereby withdraws as counsel for Defendant New York State Teachers' Retirement System, s/h/a "New York State Teachers Retire," in the above-captioned action, and requests that his appearance herein be terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(ama)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 805 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND ORDER: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that as of the close of business on May 31, 2013, Mark E. Klein will no longer be employed by the Office of the Attorney General of the State of New York and, accordingly, hereby withdraws as counsel for Defendant New York State Insurance Fund in the above-captioned action, and requests that his appearance herein be terminated. PLEASE TAKE FURTHER NOTICE that the Office of the Attorney General of the State of New York continues to serve as counsel of record for Defendant New York State Insurance Fund through Assistant Attorney General Alissa Wright, who has already appeared in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(ama)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER in case 1:11-cv-04784-RJS; denying (2485) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; denying (2487) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS; denying [] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; denying [] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:11-cv-04784-RJS. Because Tower View is not an individual, it cannot proceed pro se. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the motion to withdraw is DENIED without prejudice to renewal upon Tower View's retention of new counsel. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Doc. Nos. 2485 and 2487. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/16/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(ama)
April 10, 2013 Filing 802 NOTICE OF MOTION to Dismiss all allegations and charges against Alexander D. Solon and Paula Solon. Document filed by Alexander D. Solon, Paula Solon.(sc)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ORDER: granting (798) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:11-cv-04784-RJS; granting (2394) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting [] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS; granting [] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:11-cv-04784-RJS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that William Kennedy Dodds is granted leave to withdraw from his representation of the above named Defendants in this action and that such withdrawal is effective immediately.. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:11-cv-04784-RJS(ama)
April 1, 2013 Filing 800 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Rappaport Family Trust U/A dtd 6/4/92 served on 2/6/2013, answer due 2/27/2013; Nanette Rosenberg served on 2/6/2013, answer due 2/27/2013; The Trust U/A dtd 2/23/81 by Michael Rosenberg served on 2/6/2013, answer due 2/27/2013; The Trust U/A dtd 11/2/77 by Robert Rosenberg served on 2/6/2013, answer due 2/27/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
March 27, 2013 Filing 799 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge William H. Pauley, III is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(sjo)
March 21, 2013 Filing 798 MOTION for William Kennedy Dodds to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion of Withdraw of Counsel. Document filed by Amida Capital Management LLC, Pacific Select Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER APPROVING PROTOCOL GOVERNING RETENTION AND DISCOVERY OF DOCUMENTS HELD BY COURT-APPOINTED EXAMINER, KENNETH N. KLEE, ESQ. It is ORDERED as follows: The Protocol Governing Retention and Discovery of Documents Held by Court-Appointed Examiner, Kenneth N. Klee, Esq. attached hereto as Exhibit A is APPROVED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(rjm)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' THIRD OMNIBUS MOTION TO ENLARGE THE TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINTS: granting (323) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; granting (391) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; granting (765) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; granting (125) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04900-WHP; granting (69) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-05136-WHP; granting (2166) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting (215) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09319-WHP; granting (170) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09406-WHP; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09407-WHP; granting (291) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; granting (90) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09408-WHP; granting (139) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; granting (159) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09510-WHP; granting (147) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09511-WHP; granting (128) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09512-WHP; granting (164) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09514-WHP; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09515-WHP; granting (232) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09568-WHP; granting (135) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09569-WHP; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09570-WHP; granting (579) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; granting (196) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; granting (99) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09591-WHP; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; granting (162) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09588-WHP; granting (220) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09600-WHP; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09599-WHP; granting (222) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09598-WHP; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; granting (68) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09596-WHP; granting (197) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; granting (83) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09594-WHP; granting (155) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09587-WHP; granting (259) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; granting (88) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09585-WHP; granting (108) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09581-WHP; granting (188) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09582-WHP; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09584-WHP; granting (241) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; granting (239) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09571-WHP; granting (328) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00061-WHP; granting (228) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00062-WHP; granting (223) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00065-WHP; granting (706) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00550-WHP; granting (165) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00551-WHP; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00552-WHP; granting (114) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP; granting (185) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00555-WHP; granting (755) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-02652-WHP; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-04539-WHP; granting (10) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-06055-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (82) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (25) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (13) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (112) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (191) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (110) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (359) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (446) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (81) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (148) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (200) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (40) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (122) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (178) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (42) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (183) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (57) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (18) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (181) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; grant
February 22, 2013 Filing 795 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Marjorie Rozman served on 1/22/2013, answer due 2/13/2013; The Elizabeth L. Levin 2006 SZ-2 Year Grantor Retained Annuity Trust under Agreement Dated 7/31/06 served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 794 SCHEDULING ORDER: The oral argument scheduled for March 1, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. on the Phase One Motions to Dismiss and on the Tendering PHONES Holders' Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs is adjourned to April 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (Oral Argument set for 4/26/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III). (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(pl)
February 4, 2013 Filing 793 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (106 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 180 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 94 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 587 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 124 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 102 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 150 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 215 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 219 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 314 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 189 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 64 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 116 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 711 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 63 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 78 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 57 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 103 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 135 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 94 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 146 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 66 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 233 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 157 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 269 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 208 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 122 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 187 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 296 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 1670 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 104 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 218 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 542 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 369 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 206 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 101 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
February 4, 2013 Filing 792 DECLARATION of David C. Bohan in Support re: (106 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 180 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 94 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 587 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 124 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 102 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 150 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 215 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 219 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 314 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 189 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 64 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 116 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 711 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 63 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 78 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 57 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 103 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 135 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 94 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 146 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 66 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 233 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 157 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 269 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 208 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 122 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 187 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 296 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 1670 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 104 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 218 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 542 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 369 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 206 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 101 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 791 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court having received the attached letter request of Citadel Equity Fund Ltd., Camden Asset Management LP, and certain of their affiliates (collectively, the "Tendering PHONES Holders") to file a motion to intervene as plaintiffs in this multidistrict litigation, dated November 13,2012, the following briefing schedule is entered: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama)
January 28, 2013 Filing 790 DECLARATION of Geoffrey A. Belzer in support of Request for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Delaware Charter Guarantee & Trust Co., as Trustee & The PBO Lisa M. Featherer IRA R/O in Support re: #789 MOTION for DANIEL J. MCMAHON, REBECCA M. ROTHMANN & GEOFFREY A. BELZER to Withdraw as Attorney for Delaware Charter Guarantee & Trust Co., as Trustee for Lisa M. Featherer IRA R/O.. Document filed by Deleware Charter Guarantee & Trust CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Belzer, Geoffrey)
January 28, 2013 Filing 789 MOTION for DANIEL J. MCMAHON, REBECCA M. ROTHMANN & GEOFFREY A. BELZER to Withdraw as Attorney for Delaware Charter Guarantee & Trust Co., as Trustee for Lisa M. Featherer IRA R/O. Document filed by Deleware Charter Guarantee & Trust CO..(Belzer, Geoffrey)
January 25, 2013 Filing 788 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deidre Ann Grossman on behalf of Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers & Grain Millers International Pension Fund (Grossman, Deidre)
January 25, 2013 Filing 787 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Carol E Newman served on 12/10/2012, answer due 12/31/2012; Intersil Equity Income Fund served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
January 24, 2013 Filing 786 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Woodmont Investments Ltd served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/25/2012; Alphadyne International Master Fund Ltd. served on 12/17/2012, answer due 1/7/2013; Dennis S. Bunder served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; Direxion Insurance Trust served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
January 23, 2013 Filing 785 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Mizuho Trust & Banking Co. (USA) served on 1/7/2013, answer due 1/28/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2013 Filing 784 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. for Mizuho Trust & Banking Co. (USA). Document filed by Mizuho Trust & Banking Co. (USA).(Aaronson, Matthew)
January 22, 2013 Filing 783 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joel Aaronson on behalf of Mizuho Trust & Banking Co. (USA) (Aaronson, Matthew)
January 22, 2013 Filing 782 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hollace Topol Cohen on behalf of Mizuho Trust & Banking Co. (USA) (Cohen, Hollace)
January 22, 2013 Filing 781 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Harvest AA Capital LP served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; New Americans LLC served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Wabash/Harvest Partners LP served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; James F. Hoge, Jr served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013; Invenio Partners LP served on 12/11/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; Stephen R. Manheimer served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; T. Rowe Price Index Trust, Inc. served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Elizabeth L. Levin served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013; LOMBARDI & CO., INC. served on 12/17/2012, answer due 1/7/2013; Elizabeth De Cuevas served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Kellog Capital Markets LLC served on 12/20/2012, answer due 1/10/2013; Latigo Master Fund Ltd. served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; LP Ma1 Ltd. served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Alphadyne Asset Management LLC served on 12/17/2012, answer due 1/7/2013; Gurdon H. Metz served on 12/19/2012, answer due 1/9/2013; Robert Mosberg served on 12/20/2012, answer due 1/10/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
January 18, 2013 Filing 780 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Substitution of Party, Counsel, and Liaison Counsel [Docket No.2179], Notice of Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints [Docket No. 2166], Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion [Docket No.2170], Declaration of David Zensky [Docket No. 2167], Declaration of Jay Teitelbaum, Esq. [Docket No. 2168] and Declaration of James S. Green, Jr. [Docket No. 2169[ on 1/11/13. Service was made by ECF and Mail. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 18, 2013 Filing 779 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by THE FRANCISCAN MISSIONARY UNION.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Zourigui, Jennifer)
January 18, 2013 Filing 778 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Blaire Zourigui on behalf of THE FRANCISCAN MISSIONARY UNION Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Zourigui, Jennifer)
January 18, 2013 Filing 777 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suhana S. Han on behalf of Towerview LLC (Han, Suhana)
January 17, 2013 Filing 776 REQUEST FOR LEAVE BY STEPHANIE G. WHEELER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR TOWER LLC in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; denying (2053) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; denying Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP. PLEASE TAKE FURTHER NOTICE that Stephanie G. Wheeler hereby requests removal from the cm/ecf notification system as well as all other means of written or electronic notification lists. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION DENIED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(ja)
January 14, 2013 Filing 775 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jay Goldman & Co. LP, Jay Goldman Master LP, Woodmont Investments Ltd.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
January 14, 2013 Filing 774 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Jay Goldman & Co. LP, Jay Goldman Master LP, Woodmont Investments Ltd Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
January 14, 2013 Filing 773 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Jay Goldman & Co. LP, Jay Goldman Master LP, Woodmont Investments Ltd Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Kessenick, Scott)
January 14, 2013 Filing 772 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Jay Goldman & Co. LP, Jay Goldman Master LP, Woodmont Investments Ltd Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Bilus, Alexander)
January 14, 2013 Filing 771 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Amida Capital Management LLC, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Walker House SPV Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
January 11, 2013 Filing 769 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 768 DECLARATION of James S. Green, Jr. in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 767 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 766 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 765 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Schedule of Avoidance Actions))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 10, 2013 Filing 764 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Drawbridge Global Macro, Master Fund Ltd-K served on 1/7/2013, answer due 1/28/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2013 Filing 763 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Eliott Klein on behalf of New York State Insurance Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Klein, Mark)
January 4, 2013 Filing 762 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mary Lou Ricotta served on 12/3/2012, answer due 12/24/2012; St. Francis Friends of the Poor, Inc. served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; THE FRANCISCAN MISSIONARY UNION served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; John G. Kologi served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; Mount Ararat Cemetery, Inc. served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Arnold Manheimer served on 12/3/2012, answer due 12/24/2012; Sophie McConnell served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Malcolm McConnell served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Elaine Cheah-Richert served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; Edith A. Ehrlich served on 12/3/2012, answer due 12/24/2012; Anthony Y. Lin served on 12/3/2012, answer due 12/24/2012; Latigo Partners LP served on 12/6/2012, answer due 12/27/2012; Lyxor Alphadyne, SPC served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/25/2012; Jay Goldman Master LP served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/25/2012; Jay Goldman & Co. LP served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/25/2012; Harvest Capital LP served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/25/2012; David Hochberg served on 12/3/2012, answer due 12/24/2012; IBEW Local 25 Retirement Funds Master Trust served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
December 26, 2012 Filing 770 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Mike Eugene Abernethy, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(rdz)
December 23, 2012 Filing 761 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sterne Agee Group, Inc. for Sterne Agee & Leach Inc.. Document filed by Sterne Agee & Leach Inc..(D'Agostino, Michael)
December 23, 2012 Filing 760 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of Sterne Agee & Leach Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
December 23, 2012 Filing 759 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by T. Rowe Price Index Trust, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
December 23, 2012 Filing 758 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of T. Rowe Price Index Trust, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
December 21, 2012 Filing 757 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
December 21, 2012 Filing 756 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement on 12/21/2012. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Empire State Carpenters Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Madan, Allison)
December 21, 2012 Filing 755 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Empire State Carpenters Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Madan, Allison)
December 21, 2012 Filing 754 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. LMA SPC for and on Behalf of MAP I Segregated Portfolio served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Iglesia Metodista Del Peru served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; RBC Global Asset Management Inc. served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; RBC O'Shaughnessy U.S. Value Fund served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; RBC O'Shaughnessy Canadian Equity Fund served on 12/5/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; FERRIS TRADING FUND LLC served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Muriel Hyman served on 12/4/2012, answer due 12/26/2012; Scott R. Klarquist served on 12/11/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; Toro Trading LLC served on 12/11/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
December 21, 2012 Filing 753 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Empire State Carpenters Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Madan, Allison)
December 21, 2012 Filing 752 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison A. Madan on behalf of Board of Trustees of the Empire State Carpenters Pension Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Madan, Allison)
December 19, 2012 Filing 751 DECLARATION of Stephanie G. Wheeler in Support re: #750 MOTION for Stephanie G. Wheller to Withdraw as Attorney.. Document filed by Towerview LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed) Order)(Wheeler, Stephanie)
December 19, 2012 Filing 750 MOTION for Stephanie G. Wheller to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Towerview LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Wheeler, Stephanie)
December 18, 2012 Filing 749 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paige E. Barr on behalf of FERRIS TRADING FUND LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Barr, Paige)
December 18, 2012 Filing 748 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of FERRIS TRADING FUND LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Bohan, David)
December 18, 2012 Filing 747 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel G. Jarcho on behalf of Michael Loeb Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Jarcho, Daniel)
December 7, 2012 Filing 746 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers & Grain Millers International Pension Fund waiver sent on 11/6/2012, answer due 1/7/2013. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
December 7, 2012 Filing 745 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Twin Securities, Inc. waiver sent on 10/10/2012, answer due 12/10/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
December 7, 2012 Filing 744 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Charter Partners LP waiver sent on 10/10/2012, answer due 12/10/2012; William Monopoli waiver sent on 10/10/2012, answer due 12/10/2012; Mary K. Monopoli waiver sent on 10/10/2012, answer due 12/10/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
December 7, 2012 Filing 743 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Harvest AA Capital LP, Harvest Capital LP, New Americans LLC, Wabash/Harvest Partners LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Momborquette, David)
December 7, 2012 Filing 742 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Harvest AA Capital LP, Harvest Capital LP, New Americans LLC, Wabash/Harvest Partners LP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Blase, Kristie)
December 7, 2012 Filing 741 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Keith Momborquette on behalf of Harvest AA Capital LP, Harvest Capital LP, New Americans LLC, Wabash/Harvest Partners LP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Momborquette, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 740 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of William Sanderson Twaddell Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
December 6, 2012 Filing 739 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth M. Kean on behalf of Margaret T.M. Jones CP & CO AC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Kean, Seth)
December 6, 2012 Filing 738 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Jan Banas, Jr on behalf of Carol E Newman (Banas, Mitchell)
December 6, 2012 Filing 737 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Jan Banas, Jr on behalf of Carol E Newman Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Banas, Mitchell)
December 6, 2012 Filing 736 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation for 1IA SPX1. Document filed by 1IA SPX1.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Cantor, Daniel)
December 6, 2012 Filing 735 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Lucas Cantor on behalf of 1IA SPX1 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Cantor, Daniel)
November 30, 2012 Filing 734 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jill Kaplin waiver sent on 10/10/2012, answer due 12/10/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
November 29, 2012 Filing 733 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Eliott Klein on behalf of New York Estate Teacher's Retirement System Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Klein, Mark)
November 29, 2012 Filing 732 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Eliott Klein on behalf of New York State Common Retirement Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Klein, Mark)
November 29, 2012 Filing 731 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Eliott Klein on behalf of New York State Insurance Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Klein, Mark)
November 29, 2012 Filing 730 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pond View Credit (Master) L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Momborquette, David)
November 29, 2012 Filing 729 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Pond View Credit (Master) L.P. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Blase, Kristie)
November 29, 2012 Filing 728 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Keith Momborquette on behalf of Pond View Credit (Master) L.P. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Momborquette, David)
November 27, 2012 Filing 727 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Nguyen on behalf of Schultze Asset Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Nguyen, Anthony)
November 27, 2012 Filing 726 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Swiss Re America Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Swiss Re America Holding Corp. for Swiss Re Financial Products Corp.. Document filed by Swiss Re Financial Products Corp..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Momborquette, David)
November 21, 2012 Filing 725 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
November 20, 2012 Filing 724 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
November 20, 2012 Filing 723 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
November 19, 2012 Filing 722 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Twin Securities Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Gussman, William)
November 19, 2012 Filing 721 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Twin Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Blase, Kristie)
November 19, 2012 Filing 720 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Hayward Gussman, Jr on behalf of Twin Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Gussman, William)
November 16, 2012 Filing 719 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of Dreyfus Active Midcap Fund, Dreyfus Basic S&P 500 Stock Index Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Ratner, Stephen)
November 15, 2012 Filing 718 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Henri Cohen on behalf of Texas Scottish Rite Hospital for Crippled Children, Vester Hughes (Cohen, Paul)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 717 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant O'Shaughnessy Asset Management, LLC, who has neither moved nor answered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/09/2012) (ama)
November 14, 2012 Filing 716 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Peter O'Hanlon on behalf of Nancy G. Lezette Estate Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(O'Hanlon, Edward)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 715 INDIVIDUAL CREDITOR PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS SCHEDULE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and paragraph 13 of Master Case Order No.3 [Docket No. 1395], Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively, the "Note Holder Plaintiffs"), and Plaintiffs William A. Niese et al. (the "Retiree Plaintiffs" and, together with the Note Holder Plaintiffs, the "Individual Creditor Plaintiffs") hereby give notice that they have dismissed the actions listed below without prejudice solely against the corresponding defendants listed below (collectively, the "Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendants"): For the avoidance of doubt, and pursuant to paragraph 13 of Master Case Order No.3, such dismissals shall be without prejudice to: (i) each Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendant's inclusion in the putative class of defendants; and (ii) the Individual Creditor Plaintiffs' ability to reassert claims against any Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendant as a named defendant if subsequent information later reveals that any such Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendant received greater than $100,000 in Shareholder Transfers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/09/2012) (ama)
November 12, 2012 Filing 714 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Kim Lerner on behalf of DEPFA Bank PLC((Hypo Real Estate Bank Int'l)), DEPFA Bank PLC, GDK INC., Emanuel Gruss, HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Lerner, Jennifer)
November 6, 2012 Filing 713 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) Motion To Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6), And The Exhibit Thereto, And (ii) Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion, And The Exhibit Thereto on 11/6/2012. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 712 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 711 MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. Responses due by 12/21/2012 Return Date set for 3/1/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Steven R. Schoenfeld dated 10/24/2012 re: I request that the Court so order the substitution of Robinson & Cole LLP for Dorsey & Whitney LLP with respect to my role as a member of the Defendants' Executive Committees under Master Case Order No. 3. The enclosed notice of the submission of this letter requesting this change has been sent to all counsel via ECF filing in 12 MC 2296. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/26/2012). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al. Docket entry to be made in 12mc2296, 11md2296 and member cases as per Chambers. (rjm)
October 26, 2012 Filing 709 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Francis Hauser on behalf of Carret Asset Management Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Hauser, Gregory)
October 25, 2012 Filing 708 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Amida Capital Management LLC, Pacific Select Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Kessenick, Scott)
October 25, 2012 Filing 707 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Amida Capital Management LLC, Clearwater Investment Trust, Pacific Select Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Doluisio, Michael)
October 25, 2012 Filing 706 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Amida Capital Management LLC, Clearwater Investment Trust, Pacific Select Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Bilus, Alexander)
October 22, 2012 Filing 705 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 703 PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and paragraph 13 of Master Case Order No.3 [Docket No. 1395], Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes (collectively, the "Plaintiffs"), hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against each of the defendants listed below (collectively, the "Paragraph 13 Dismissed Defendants"): Epstein Family Revocable Trust; John Doe, as Trustee of Epstein Family Revocable Trust; QVT Financial LP; Secretaria to Mutual Benefit Association for Tokyo Metropolitan Employees; and Spear Leeds and Kellogg. In addition, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against each of the defendants listed below (collectively, the "Other Dismissed Defendants"): Alson Cap Partners LLC/Alson Signature FD Offshore M&C Corporate Services LTD.; Alson Capital Partners, LLC; Alson Signature Fund Offshore Portfolio, LTD.; B Trade Services LLC; Capitalia Asset Management SGR S.P.A.; Capitalia Azionario USA; Capitalia Azionario USA C/O Capitalia AM SGR SPA C/O Unicredit S.P.A.; E-Connectivity Average PX; Firstar Trust Company; Instinet Corp NY; Investment Technology Group Inc.; John Doe, as Owner of Mergers Investment Trading Account Long; MACM8; Mutual of Amer Life Ins Co A/C Equity-Index Fund; Mutual of America Capital Management Corp.; Mutual of America Investment Corp. Equity Index Fund; Quintessence Fund, LP; and Unicredit S.P.A. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(lmb)
October 11, 2012 Filing 702 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL:Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant Mizuho Bank, Ltd., who has neither moved nor answered., Mitzuho Bank, Ltd. and Mitzuho Bank, Ltd. terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(lmb)
October 9, 2012 Filing 704 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #379 Amended Complaint against 1IA SPX1, ABN AMRO Clearing Chicago LLC, ABP, ANIMA SGR S.p.A, ASB Advisors LLC, Adaly Investment Management Co., Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., Adaly Opportunity Fund, L.P., Alexander D and Paula Solon JTWROS, Alexander Solon Irra FBO Alexander Solon C/O MLPF&S Cust FPO, Alexandra Global Master Fund LTD, Amalgamated Bank, Amici Associates LP, Amici Fund International LTD, Amici Qualified Associates, Amida Capital Management LLC, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Amundi Investment Advisors USA, Inc., Anima Societa' Di Gestione C/O BPM Capital Trust GSS LLC, Archdiocese Of New York Master Trust, Arrow Distressed Securities Fund, BMO Nesbit Burns Inc., BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc./CDS, BMO Nesbitt Burns Trading Corp. SA, BPM Capital Trust, Bakery CONF TOB WRKS Local 102, Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers & Grain Millers Union Local 102, Baldwin Enterprises, Inc., Bank of Tokyo - Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Barry Kupferberg David & Lori Banner Kupferberg JT TEN, Bell Atlantic Master Trust, Phoebe P. Bender, Matthew Bender IV, Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd., Blue Chip Fund, a series of First Investors Equity Funds, Blue Chip Fund, a series of First Investors Life Series Funds, Harvey Bookman, Mary F. Brown, William J. Brown, Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Brown Brothers Harriman and Company/ETF, Lawrence B. Buttenwieser, Esq., CBS Master Trust, CEDE & Co C/O Depository Trust Company, CEDE & Co.,, CIM XVI LLC, Carret Asset Management, Caxton Associates LP, Cedar Grove Cemetery Association Perpetual Care, Vilma L. Chantilles, Charles Pratt & Company LLC, Cheetah & Co., Citadel Equity Fund Ltd., Citi Goldentree, LTD, Citigroup Securities Services Inc., Clearwater Investment, Clearwater Investment Trust, Cogent Management Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Commerzbank AG, Consolidated Edison Of NY K801, Convertibles Strategic Hold, D E Shaw Valence Portfolio LLC, DBSO Securities Ltd., DEPFA Bank PLC((Hypo Real Estate Bank Int'l)), DEPFA Bank PLC, Delaware Charter G & T TTEE, Deleware Charter Guarantee & Trust CO., Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Depository Trust Company, Dexia Bank C/O Dexia Credit Local, Dexia Credit Local, New York Branch, Direxion Funds, Drawbridge Global Macro, Master Fund Ltd-K, Dresdner Bank, AG, Dresdner Bank, AG C/O Commerzbank AG, Dreyfus Active Midcap Fund, Dreyfus Basic S&P 500 Stock Index Fund, Dreyfus Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus S&P 500 Stock Index Fund, Dreyfus/Laurel Funds Inc, Dynamic Domestic Fund LP, ETrade Clearing LLC, EAC Management LP, EAC Partners Master Fund LTD, Emanuel E. Geduld 2005 Family Trust, Equity League Pension Trust Fund, Evergreen Asset Management C/O Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., Evergreen Asset Management Corp., Evolution All-Cap Equity Fund, Peter Fairweather, Fairweather Family L.P., Fideuram Bank Luxembourg S.A., Ian Fierstein, Jesse Fierstein, Micah Fierstein, Bram Fierstein, First Investors Life Series Fund Utilities Series, First Investors Utilities Income, Flexible US Equity Managers, Flexible US Equity Managers Portfolio 1 LLC, Folksamerica Reinsurance Company, Fordham University, Fortis Clearing Americas LLC 695, Foulard and Co., GDK INC., GMIMCO Trust, GMIMCO Trust (General Motors Investment Management Corp.), GMIMCO Trust (General Motors) Bruce Marquand, Mario J. Gabelli, Gabelli & Company Inc., Gabelli Asset Management Company, Gabelli Average Price 2, Gabelli Funds, Inc., Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Gabelli Funds Inc.) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Gabelli) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Th Gabelli Equity INC FD) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (The Gabelli Asset Fund) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (The Gabelli Global Multimed TR) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc.(Gabelli ABC Fund), Gabelli Funds, LLC, Gabelli Global Deal Fund, Gabelli Securities, Inc., Gabelli Value Fund, Inc., Gamco Asset Management Inc., Gamco Investors Inc., Cara Leigh Gillespie-Wilson, Goldentree Asset Management LP, Goldentree Master Fund II, Ltd, Goldentree Master Fund Ltd., Goldentree Master Fund Ltd. C/O Golden Tree Asset Management LP, Goldentree Multistrategy LTD, Goldentree Multistrategy Offshore Fund, Goldentree Multistrategy Offshore Fund C/O Golden Tree Asset Management LP, Governing Council of the University of Toronto, Government Of Singapore Investment Corp PTE LTD, Greenock Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd., Ruth Gruenthal, Emanuel Gruss, Gryphon Hidden Values VIII LTD, HFF I LLC, HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L, Havens Partners Enhanced Fund, L.P., Havens Partners, L.P., Hearst Equity Appreciation Plan, Helen Buttenwieser Trust 7/28/38, Himan Brown Revocable Trust, Himan Brown, TR UA 11/20/02 Himan Brown Revocable Trust, David L. Hoexter, Homeland and Insurance Company Of New York C/O One Beacon Insurance Co., Homeland and Insurance Company of New York, Polly H. Howells, Hudson Bay Fund LP, Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd., Charles E. Hugel, IBEW Local 25 Master Trust Plan, ITG Inc., Institutional Benchmarks Series (Master Feeder) Limited, Institutional Benchmarks Series (Master Feeder) Limited C/O LYRA Capital LLC, Intersil Equity Inc. Fund, Iolaire Investors LLP, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jerome & Maria Markowitz JTWROS, Jonathan A. Knee, Barry David Kupferberg, Lori Banner Kupferberg, Kurt Adler Estate, L3 Communication Corporation Master Trust, LYRA Capital LLC, Robert E. LaBlanc, LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC, Leavitt J. Pope Estate, Legg Mason Partners, Lenox Hill Hospital, Dorothy A. Levenson, Fredric Levenson, Nancu G Lezette, Lighthouse Partners LLC/ LMA SPC OBO MAP I Segrgtn Prtf C/O Lighthouse Partners LLC, Anna Livingstone, Local 102 Pension/NO TR VAL IM, Michael Loeb, Loeb Arbitrage Management LP, M&T Bank, M. Safra & Co., Inc., Madison Square Investors Large-Cap Enhanced Index Fund LP (f/k/a NYLIM-QS Large Cap Enhanced Fund LP), Madison Square Large-Cap Enhanced Index Fund LP, Thomas J. Majorana, Binhua Mao, Margaret T.M. Jones CP & CO AC, Jerome Markowitz, Maria Markowitz, Susan J. Martin, Mary Jane F. Moeller Trust U/A/D 8/7/2006, Master Trust Bank of Japan LTD, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Ernest W. Michel, Mid Atlantic Capital Corp., Millenco LLC, Mitsubishi UFJ, Mitsubishi UFJ Asset MGMT #968364 (Through Master Trust Bank Of Japan)C/O Bank Of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Mitsubishi UFJ Asset Management LTD, Mary Jane F. Moeller, Monetary Authority of Singapore, Monetary Authority/ Singapore, Mr Violet and Mrs Leslie Payne Jtwros, Multi-Strategy Greenock Master Fund Ltd, Mutual of America Investment Corp., Nancy G. Lezette Estate, Natixis Bleichroeder LLC, Neuberger Berman Inc., New Eagle Holdings LLC, New Eagle Holdings LLC Risk Arbitrage, New York City Deferred Compensation Plan, New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, New York Estate Teacher's Retirement System, New York State Common Retirement Fund, New York State Insurance Fund, Newedge USA, LLC, Newedge USA, LLC, Equity Clearing Division, Nomura Securities International Inc.-Stock Lending, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Traits Omni, Pacific Select, Pacific Select Fund, Helena Pai, Paul Pai, Paris Trading, Paul Pai & Helena Pai Joint Tenant, Leslie Payne, Violet Payne, Pension Commingle Fund, SWAPS, SBI, Pension Fund Association for Local Government Officials, Pension Trust Fund Local Union#27, John R. Polatschek TOD, Pond View Credit (Master) L.P., Martha P. Pope, Martha P. Pope(Executrix, Estate of Leavitt J. Pope), Porter Orlin LLC, Portfolio 1 Offshore Master LP LSV C/O GS & CO, Putnam Lovell NBF Securities Inc., QVT Fund, QVT Fund LP, R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC, R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Decommissioning Trust, R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Deommissioning Trust, R.E. Ginna Qualified Decommissioning Trust, RIEF RMP LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, RIEF Trading LLC, RIEF Trading LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, Risk Facil 99: Close /Risk, Geraldo Rivera, Robeco Investment Management, Inc., Robert A. and Jamie A. Simins JTWROS, Julia K. Rosenwald, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Trust Corporation of Canada, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SPX Principal Strategy U.S. Shares Programs, SS&C TECHNOLOGIES HOLDINGS, INC.;, SS&C Technologies, Inc., Sandelman Partners Multi-Strategy Master Fund, LTD, Schultze Asset Management, LLC, Sherbet & Co., Shirley J Sperling and Susan J Martin JT Ten, Jamie A. Simins, Robert A. Simins, Societe General Asset Management, Societe Generale Asset MGMT Co, Alexander Solon, Alexander D. Solon, Paula Solon, Kellogg Shierley J Sperling, Shirley J. Sperling, Spinningrod & Co., Sterne Agee & Leach Inc., Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP, Stichting Pensioenfonds Hoogovens, Stichting Pensioenfonds OCE, Stichting Pensioenfonds VAN DE ABN AMRO N.V., Stichting Pensioenfonds Van de C/O ABP Investments US, Inc., Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg C/O ABP Investments US, Inc., Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn, Stichting Pensionenfonds ABP C/O ABP Investments US, Inc., Stichting Pensionenfonds OCE C/O ABO Investments US, Inc., Strategic Funds, Inc., Strategic Opportunity, Strategic Opportunity BMO Nesbitt Burns C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd., Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd. Trustee, Swaps, SBI, Swiss American Securities Inc., Swiss Re Financial Products Corp., Systeia Capital Management, T Rowe Price Balanced Fund, Inc., T Rowe Price Trust CO., T. Rowe Price Associates (Fourlard and CO), T. Rowe Price Associates (Spinningrod & Co), T. Rowe Price Associates C/O CT Corporation, T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. (Foulard and Co), T. Rowe Price Balanced Fund, Inc. (incorrectly named as "T. Rowe Price Balanced Fund - Large Cap Core"), T. Rowe Price Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Equity Series, Inc., T. Rowe Price Mid-Cap Value Fund, Inc., T. Rowe Price Trust Co., T. Rowe Price Trust Company, T.D. Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity Pooled Fund Trust, T.Rowe Price Associates, T.Rowe P
October 9, 2012 Filing 701 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 28, 2012 Filing 700 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary S. Goldberg on behalf of Ernest W. Michel (Goldberg, Zachary)
September 28, 2012 Filing 699 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hearst Equity Appreciation Plan served on 8/29/2012, answer due 9/19/2012; Paris Trading served on 9/6/2012, answer due 9/27/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
September 27, 2012 Filing 698 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant Christian Brothers Investment Services, Inc., who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(lmb)
September 27, 2012 Filing 697 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Exchangeable Notes commonly referred to as the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendants Lighthouse Partners, LLC, and Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC, who have neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(lmb)
September 25, 2012 Filing 696 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roland Mark Cavalier on behalf of Mary Jane F. Moeller (Cavalier, Roland)
September 13, 2012 Filing 695 NOTICE of Notice of Filing and Service re: (1395 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1395 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, (1419 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
September 13, 2012 Filing 694 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Bank of New York Mellon, Other Affiliate Verizon Communications Inc. for Bell Atlantic Master Trust. Document filed by Bell Atlantic Master Trust.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Laddin, Darryl)
September 13, 2012 Filing 693 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darryl S. Laddin on behalf of Bell Atlantic Master Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Laddin, Darryl)
September 13, 2012 Filing 692 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Pleadings Relating to Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints re: (1370 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (1364 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints., (1367 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1366 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1365 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (1368 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
September 4, 2012 Filing 691 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Carbonara on behalf of Ruanwil LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Carbonara, Richard)
September 4, 2012 Filing 690 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Carbonara on behalf of Stanton R. Cook Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Carbonara, Richard)
August 31, 2012 Filing 689 NOTICE of Notice of Filing and Service of Pleading re: (1364 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints., (1367 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1366 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1365 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (1368 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
August 30, 2012 Filing 688 MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
August 30, 2012 Filing 687 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Daniel P. Goldberger of Proskauer Rose as counsel of record for Dreyfus Stock Index Funds, Inc.. Document filed by Dreyfus Stock Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus Stock Index Fund, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Goldberger, Daniel)
August 24, 2012 Filing 686 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melanie Anita Grossman on behalf of Jerome Markowitz, Maria Markowitz (Grossman, Melanie)
August 24, 2012 Filing 685 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett D. Jaffe on behalf of Jerome Markowitz, Maria Markowitz (Jaffe, Brett)
August 20, 2012 Filing 684 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Allen Meister on behalf of Ruth Gruenthal. New Address: Pedowitz & Meister LLP, 570 Lexington Avenue, NewYork, NY, USA 10022, 212 403 7330. (Meister, Robert)
July 23, 2012 Filing 683 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP, New Attorney: New York State Attorney General, Address: 120 Broadway, 24th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10271, 212-416-6035. Document filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Wright, Alissa)
July 20, 2012 Filing 682 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
July 16, 2012 Filing 681 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ronald Christopher Owens on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. New Address: Aronauer, Re & Yudell, LLP, One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42nd Street, Suite 1420, New York, New York, 10165, (212) 755-6000. (Owens, Ronald)
July 16, 2012 Filing 680 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kenneth Steven Yudell on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. New Address: Aronauer, Re & Yudell, LLP, One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42nd Street, Suite 1420, New York, New York, 10165, (212) 755-6000. (Yudell, Kenneth)
July 16, 2012 Filing 679 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joseph Aronauer on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. New Address: Aronauer, Re & Yudell, LLP, One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42nd Street, Suite 1420, New York, New York, 10165, (212) 755-6000. (Aronauer, Joseph)
July 13, 2012 Filing 678 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alissa Schecter Wright on behalf of New York State Common Retirement Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Wright, Alissa)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 677 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial case management conference having been conducted on July 10, 2012, the following schedule is entered on consent:1. Defendants in the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company, et al v. FitzSimons, et al., 12 Civ 2652 (WHP) (the "Committee Action") are directed to submit a proposed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multi district litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. See Manual for Complex Litig., 10.221 (4th ed. 2004). The proposed organizational structure will be subject to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by August 3, 2012. This Court appoints Grippo & Elden LLC to act as interim liaison counsel for defendants in the Committee Action.2.If defendants in the Committee Action cannot agree on a proposed organizational structure, competing applications for executive committees should be docketed on 12 MC 2296 and all related actions and submitted to chambers no later than August 3, 2012.3. Interim liaison counsel are directed to submit a proposed Master Case Order No. 3 consistent with this Court's directives by August 7, 2012. Where the parties cannot agree, they should submit alternative proposals for the Court's consideration. If necessary, the parties are permitted to submit letter memoranda in support of their respective positions. 4.Plaintiffs are directed to submit a letter memorandum outlining the limited discovery they now wish to pursue by July 26, 2012. Defendants shall submit a letter memorandum in response by August 16, 2012 5.This multi district litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(js)
July 9, 2012 Filing 676 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alfred N. Metz on behalf of Jamie A. Simins, Robert A. Simins Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Metz, Alfred)
July 9, 2012 Filing 675 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alfred N. Metz on behalf of Julia K. Rosenwald Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Metz, Alfred)
July 9, 2012 Filing 674 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David N. Dunn on behalf of Cara Leigh Gilespie-Wilson Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Dunn, David)
July 6, 2012 Filing 673 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties of even date herewith, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes (collectively, "Plaintiffs"), hereby dismiss this action without prejudice and without costs solely against defendant The Blackstone Group LP ("Blackstone"), which has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(djc)
July 5, 2012 Filing 672 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeffrey Richard Hellman on behalf of Harvey Bookman. New Address: Law Offices of Jeffrey Hellman, LLC, 195 Church Street, 10th Floor, New Haven, CT, 06510, 203-691-8762. (Hellman, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2012 Filing 671 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Asset Management Holding S.p.A., Other Affiliate Lauro Quarantadue S.p.A, Other Affiliate Banca Monte dei Paschi di Siena S.p.A., Other Affiliate Banca Popolare di Milano S.c.ar.l., Other Affiliate Banca di Legnano S.p.A. for ANIMA SGR S.p.A. Document filed by ANIMA SGR S.p.A.(de Leeuw, Michael)
July 3, 2012 Filing 670 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael B. de Leeuw on behalf of ANIMA SGR S.p.A (de Leeuw, Michael)
June 29, 2012 Filing 669 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
June 27, 2012 Filing 667 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cheetah & Co. served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012; Foulard and Co. served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012; Sherbet & Co. served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012; Spinningrod & Co. served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012; Taskforce & Co. served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012; Intersil Equity Inc. Fund served on 6/1/2012, answer due 6/22/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 668 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL:PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the law firm of Entwistle & Cappucci LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendant Denise Meck, and G. Douglas Kilday and the law firm of Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody hereby withdraw as counsel of record for Denise Meck and shall have no further responsibility in this matter. Denise Meck hereby requests that all pleadings, notices, orders, and other papers given or filed in the above-captioned matter be given and served upon the following person at the address, telephone number, and e- mail address indicated in this order., Attorney G Douglas Kilday terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
June 25, 2012 Filing 666 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL:Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant TD Asset Management USA, Inc., who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(lmb)
June 25, 2012 Filing 665 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL:Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendants O'Shaughnessy and James P. O'Shaughnessy, who have neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(lmb)
June 25, 2012 Filing 664 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties of even date herewith, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant Global Securitization Services LLC, named in the complaint as GSS LLC, who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(lmb)
June 25, 2012 Filing 663 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gryphon Hidden Values VIII LTD.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Gussman, William)
June 25, 2012 Filing 662 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Gryphon Hidden Values VIII LTD Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Blase, Kristie)
June 25, 2012 Filing 661 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Hayward Gussman, Jr on behalf of Gryphon Hidden Values VIII LTD Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Gussman, William)
June 8, 2012 Filing 660 MOTION for William K. Dodds to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Pacific Select, Walker House SPV Ltd..(Dodds, William)
June 5, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 7/10/2012 at 11:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 659 MASTER CASE ORDER No. 2: The Clerk of the Court (the "Clerk") is directed to transfer docket entry ECF No. 692 (Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order) from 11 MD 2296 to the master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296 and number it ECF No. 18 on 12 MC 2296. The Clerk is directed to docket this Master Case Order No. 2 as ECF No. 19 on 12 MC 2296, and docket it on 11 MD 2296 and on all of the consolidated actions. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is directed to add the following plaintiff to the master case file: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. (the "Unsecured Creditors Committee"). Accordingly, the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 should list only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees, and (v) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. Interim Liaison Counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee: This Court appoints Zuckerman Spaeder LLP ("Zuckerman Spaeder") as interim liaison counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee and as further set forth in this order. All pending motions for substitution of counsel are granted. Notwithstanding the stay, parties may make motions to substitute counsel, and all such motions shall be docketed only on 11 MD 2296 and the relevant related actions and shall include a proposed order. Any party submitting a motion for substitution of counsel is directed to send a courtesy copy of the proposed order to chambers. No defendant has opposed Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion is granted. The time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve all summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21) in all actions, and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), is enlarged through and including August 31, 2012, retroactive to March 29, 2012. With respect to defendants who may be added as defendants or changed through amendments in any action on or after March 29, 2012, including defendants within the putative defendant classes who Plaintiffs determine should be individually named, the time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve the summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21), and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), shall expire no earlier than August 31, 2012. This Court will hold an initial pretrial conference with all interim liaison counsel on July 10, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss, inter alia, Defendants' co-interim liaison counsel's proposed organizational structure, a preliminary case management schedule, including a schedule for any motions to dismiss, the continuance of the stay, and any other issues counsel wish to raise. Notwithstanding Bankruptcy Judge Kevin J. Carey's Order Partially Lifting Stay of Adversary Proceedings and State Law Fraudulent Conveyance Actions, dated March 15, 2012, this multidistrict litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
May 23, 2012 Filing 658 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jose Guillermo Sepulveda on behalf of TradeStation Securities, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Sepulveda, Jose)
May 22, 2012 Filing 657 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trinity Derivatives Group LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Rasey, Randall)
May 22, 2012 Filing 656 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randall l Rasey on behalf of Trinity Derivatives Group LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Rasey, Randall)
May 11, 2012 Filing 655 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
May 1, 2012 Filing 654 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Mitsui Trust Holdings, Inc. for The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd.. Document filed by The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Stern, Jordan)
April 30, 2012 Filing 653 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Joseph Hyland on behalf of SS&C TECHNOLOGIES HOLDINGS, INC.;, SS&C Technologies, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Hyland, Mark)
April 30, 2012 Filing 652 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Joseph Hyland on behalf of Tocqueville Asset Management L.P. (Hyland, Mark)
April 26, 2012 Filing 651 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alissa Schecter Wright on behalf of New York State Insurance Fund (Wright, Alissa)
April 24, 2012 Filing 650 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Master Trust Bank of Japan LTD. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Stone, Alan)
April 24, 2012 Filing 649 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, as trustee of Christiana Care Health Services Retirement Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 24, 2012 Filing 648 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee of Self-Insurance Reserve Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 24, 2012 Filing 647 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee of Self-Insurance Reserve Fund, Wilmington Trust Company, as trustee of Christiana Care Health Services Retirement Plan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 20, 2012 Filing 646 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Binhua Mao served on 3/24/2012, answer due 4/16/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
April 19, 2012 Filing 644 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 19, 2012 Filing 643 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 19, 2012 Filing 642 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Conrad K. Chiu on behalf of Himan Brown, TR UA 11/20/02 Himan Brown Revocable Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Chiu, Conrad)
April 18, 2012 Filing 641 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Asa Robison Danes on behalf of Polly H. Howells, Eric D. Werthman, Jesse Werthman, Nicholas H. Werthman, Nicholas H. Werthman Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Danes, Asa)
April 18, 2012 Filing 640 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Polly H. Howells, Eric D. Werthman, Nicholas H. Werthman Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP(Buchanan, David)
April 18, 2012 Filing 639 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Mitzuho Bank, Ltd. served on 3/7/2012, answer due 3/28/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
April 18, 2012 Filing 638 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Anima Societa DI Gestione Del Risparmio Per Azioni served on 3/16/2012, answer due 4/6/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
April 18, 2012 Filing 637 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Pension Commingle Fund, SWAPS, SBI served on 3/7/2012, answer due 3/28/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
April 18, 2012 Filing 636 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Master Trust Bank of Japan LTD served on 3/7/2012, answer due 3/28/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
April 17, 2012 Filing 635 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Pacific Select, Walker House SPV Ltd. (Doluisio, Michael)
April 17, 2012 Filing 634 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund, Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 17, 2012 Filing 633 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Pacific Select (Bilus, Alexander)
April 13, 2012 Filing 632 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Clearwater Growth Fund, John Hancock Financial Services Inc., VFTC-Vanguard Company Stock Markey Account 21, MML Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Retirement Plan Services, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Frank Russell Investments, Frank Russell Trust, Frank Russell, Russell Equity I Fund, Russell Investment Company, Russell Investment Company Diversified Equity Fund, Russell Investment Group, Russell Investments, Russell US Core Equity Fund, HARBOR CAPITAL GROUP TRUST, HARBOR MID CAP VALUE FUND, Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc., Linda Molenda, OptionsXpress, Inc., SBL FUND SERIES H, MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Charles Swab & Co., Inc., Aegon/Transamerica Series Fund - TRP, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Vanguard Asset Allocation Fund, Inc., Vanguard Balanced Index Fund, Inc., Vanguard Equity Income Fund, Inc., Vanguard Fenway Funds, Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, Vanguard Group Inc., Vanguard Group Ltd., Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Fund, Vanguard Malvern Funds, Vanguard Quantitative Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Vanguard Whitehall Funds, Vanguard World Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Walker House SPV Ltd., Caxton Associates LLC, Oppenheimer Main Street Select Fund, Oppenheimer Main Street Small & Mid-Cap Fund, Oppenheimer Variable Account Funds, OppenheimerFunds, Inc., Pro Shares UItra S&P 500, Rydex Investments, Rydex Series Funds Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Rydex Series Funds S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable Trust Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Security Global Investors-Rydex/SGI, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, The Vanguard Group Inc, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Caxton International Limited, Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Kessenick, Scott)
April 13, 2012 Filing 631 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Clearwater Growth Fund, John Hancock Financial Services Inc., VFTC-Vanguard Company Stock Markey Account 21, MML Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Retirement Plan Services, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Frank Russell Investments, Frank Russell Trust, Frank Russell, Russell Equity I Fund, Russell Investment Company, Russell Investment Company Diversified Equity Fund, Russell Investment Group, Russell Investments, Russell US Core Equity Fund, HARBOR CAPITAL GROUP TRUST, HARBOR MID CAP VALUE FUND, Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc., Kathleen Maloney, OptionsXpress, Inc., SBL FUND SERIES H, MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Charles Swab & Co., Inc., Aegon/Transamerica Series Fund - TRP, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Vanguard Asset Allocation Fund, Inc., Vanguard Balanced Index Fund, Inc., Vanguard Equity Income Fund, Inc., Vanguard Fenway Funds, Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, Vanguard Group Inc., Vanguard Group Ltd., Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Fund, Vanguard Malvern Funds, Vanguard Quantitative Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Vanguard Whitehall Funds, Vanguard World Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Walker House SPV Ltd., Caxton Associates LLC, Oppenheimer Main Street Select Fund, Oppenheimer Main Street Small & Mid-Cap Fund, Oppenheimer Variable Account Funds, OppenheimerFunds, Inc., Pro Shares UItra S&P 500, Rydex Investments, Rydex Series Funds Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Rydex Series Funds S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable Trust Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Caxton International Limited, Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bilus, Alexander)
April 11, 2012 Filing 630 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Alexandra Global Master Fund LTD served on 1/18/2012, answer due 2/8/2012; Bram Fierstein Gen Par served on 1/24/2012, answer due 2/14/2012; Ian Fierstein served on 2/6/2012, answer due 2/27/2012; Jesse Fierstein served on 2/6/2012, answer due 2/27/2012; Micah Fierstein served on 2/3/2012, answer due 2/24/2012; Bram Fierstein served on 1/24/2012, answer due 2/14/2012; Micah Fierstein Gen Par served on 2/3/2012, answer due 2/24/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
April 10, 2012 Filing 629 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leo Kayser, III on behalf of Geraldo Rivera (Kayser, Leo)
April 10, 2012 Filing 628 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Fideuram Bank Luxembourg S.A. served on 3/6/2012, answer due 3/27/2012. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
April 10, 2012 Filing 627 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
April 6, 2012 Filing 645 Letter addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Neil Matlins, President, Matlins Financial Consulting, Inc. dated 4/2/2012 re: request your permission to plead ProSe electronically as a defendant in case number Case Number: 1:11-cv~04784. Document filed by Adaly Investment Management Co..(pl)
April 5, 2012 Filing 626 DECLARATION of David M. Zensky in Support re: #625 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
April 5, 2012 Filing 625 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company.(Zensky, David)
April 4, 2012 Filing 624 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Mark Elliott, New Attorney: Michael C. D'Agostino. Document filed by T Rowe Price Balanced Fund, Inc., T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., T. Rowe Price Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Equity Series, Inc., T. Rowe Price Mid-Cap Value Fund, Inc., T. Rowe Price Trust Company, T.Rowe Price Equity Income Trust C/O T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., T.Rowe Price Equity Index 500 Fund, T.Rowe Price Total Equity Market Index Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 623 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Mark Elliott, New Attorney: Michael C. D'Agostino. Document filed by Madison Square Investors Large-Cap Enhanced Index Fund LP (f/k/a NYLIM-QS Large Cap Enhanced Fund LP), NYLIM-QS Large Cap Enhanced Fund LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 622 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary C. Dunn on behalf of Dorothy Russell Shattuck Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Dunn, Mary)
April 4, 2012 Filing 621 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Menachem O. Zelmanovitz on behalf of New York State Common Retirement Fund (Zelmanovitz, Menachem)
March 30, 2012 Filing 620 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Legg Mason Inc. for Legg Mason Partners, Legg Mason Partners, Legg Mason Partners. Document filed by Legg Mason Partners.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
March 30, 2012 Filing 619 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of Legg Mason Partners Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
March 30, 2012 Filing 618 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Robeco Institutional Asset Management BV served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
March 29, 2012 Filing 617 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 616 DECLARATION of Andrew N. Goldfarb in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 615 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 614 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 613 MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 612 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of Vincent A Badali, The Spurgeon Family Limited Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David) Modified on 4/4/2012 (ldi).
March 23, 2012 Filing 611 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Gary Lipkin on behalf of New York City Deferred Compensation Plan, TRE Pension EFT Account Pension Payment System, TRE Pension Eft Acct PPS (Lipkin, Andrew)
March 7, 2012 Filing 610 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Court Order dated February 14, 2012 on 2/15/12. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
March 1, 2012 Filing 609 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Plaintiffs hereby dismiss the action entitled Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al. v. Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. c/o Adaly Investment Management Co., et al. without prejudice solely against defendant Ciri Gillespie, who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/1/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(mro)
March 1, 2012 Filing 608 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties of even date herewith, the Plaintiffs hereby dismiss this action without prejudice and without costs solely against defendant The Blackstone Group LP, which has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/1/2012) (mro)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 607 MASTER CASE ORDER No. 1: In the exercise of its informed discretion, this Court restructures this multidistrict litigation as follows: The Clerk is directed to open a master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296. Any filing fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The Clerk is directed to transfer the following docket entries from 11 MD 2296 to 12 MC 2296: ECF Nos. 1 (Transfer Order), 17 (Master Stay Order), 39 (Pilot Project Removal Order), 41 (Protective Order No.1), 62 (Pro Hac Order), 386 (Status Letter Order), 499 (Notice of Case Reassignment), and 559 (Temporary Stay Order). Those docket entries are to be numbered ECF Nos. 1-8, respectively, on 12 MC 2296. This Order shall be docketed as ECF No. 9 in 12 MC 2296 and docketed on all matters consolidated in 11 MD 2296. This Order and all subsequent docket entries on 12 MC 2296 are to be docketed simultaneously on 11 MD 2296. In addition, each subsequent filing by the parties on 12 MC 2296 or 11 MD 2296 shall indicate whether the filing should be docketed in all related actions or only in specified related actions. Counsel are reminded that filings are to be spread across all related actions only when necessary. Papers filed inappropriately will be stricken from the docket. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is further directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, and (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees. Plaintiffs (i)-(iii) collectively are hereafter referred to as the "Note Holders" and plaintiff (iv) is referred to as the "Retirees." Interim Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs: This Court appoints Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP ("Akin Gump") as interim liaison counsel for the Note Holders and Teitelbaum & Baskin, LLP (the "Teitelbaum Firm") as interim liaison counsel for the Retirees. All counsel for plaintiffs are directed to confer for the purpose of identifying who among them intend to submit motion papers or memoranda to this Court, appear in person for conferences, or offer oral arguments to the Court. Plaintiffs are directed to submit a list to the Court identifying such counsel by March 30, 2012. Interim Lead Defendants: Based on a preliminary review of the complaints in the related actions, this Court endeavored to select interim lead defendants with a sufficient financial interest and who represent different classes of shareholders. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following defendants: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, and Mario J. Gabelli, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders. This Court appoints Proskauer Rose LLP (for The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation), Kaye Scholer, LLP (for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated), and Entwistle & Cappucci LLP (for Mario J. Gabelli) to act as interim co-liaison counsel for defendants. These firms are collectively referred to as "defendants' interim co-liaison counsel." Defendants are directed to submit a proposed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multidistrict litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. The proposed organizational structure will be subject to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by April 20, 2012; as further set forth in this Master Case Order No. 1. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(mro)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER: The stay entered in this multi district litigation on December 28, 2012 by Judge Richard J. Holwell (ECF No. 17), and modified by Order dated January 27, 2012 (ECF No. 386), is further modified as follows: No party to this action is permitted to make any motion, file any documents on the docket, or submit any papers to the Clerk's Office or this Court's chambers until further notice from this Court. It is further ordered that all pending motions for admission pro hac vice are denied without prejudice. The Clerk ofthe Court is directed to terminate all pending motions for admission pro hac vice. This Court will establish a procedure for attorneys to appear in this action by subsequent order. Plaintiffs are directed to serve this Order on all Defendants forthwith. This order relates to all pro hac vice motions filed by attorneys in 11-MD-2296 and all related cases, denying (243) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (244) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (245) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (253) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; denying (320) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; denying (81) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (159) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (184) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (185) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (189) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (190) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (191) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (194) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (196) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (203) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (204) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (206) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (217) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (218) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (219) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (222) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (234) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (237) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (258) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (259) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (266) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (267) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (269) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (276) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (279) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (282) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (309) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (311) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (312) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (328) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (332) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (334) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (353) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (354) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (356) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (359) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (361) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (362) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (402) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (405) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (408) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (423) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (440) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (445) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (471) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (474) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (479) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (500) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (503) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (504) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (505) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (506) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (507) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (508) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (510) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (512) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (513) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (514) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (515) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (516) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (517) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (525) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (527) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (533) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (534) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (536) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (539) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (541) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (543) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (548) Motion for Leave to Appear ; denying (552) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (553) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (554) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (555) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (556) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; denying (167) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (193) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (201) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; denying (75) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (76) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; denying (344) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (346) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (352) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (369) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (370) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; denying (126) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; denying (85) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; denying (178) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (179) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (180) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; denying (55) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; denying (108) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; denying (100) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (101) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; denying (140) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (152) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (153) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; denying (137) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; denying (212) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00061-WHP; denying (160) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (161) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (162) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; denying (430) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (431) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; denying (65) Motion for Leave to Appear in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; denying (47) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(ft)
February 10, 2012 Filing 605 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dresdner Bank AG served on 1/10/2012, answer due 1/31/2012. Service was accepted by Dresdner Bank AG. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2012 Filing 604 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Loeb Arbitrage Management LP served on 1/10/2012, answer due 1/31/2012. Service was accepted by LOEB Arbitrage Management LP. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2012 Filing 603 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Flexible US Equity Managers Portfolio 1 LLC served on 1/11/2012, answer due 2/1/2012. Service was accepted by Flexible US Equity Managers Portfolio 1 LLC. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2012 Filing 602 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Spear Leeds and Kellogg served on 1/11/2012, answer due 2/1/2012. Service was accepted by Spear Leeds And Kellogg. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-04784-WHP(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2012 Filing 601 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TradeStation Group, Other Affiliate Monex Group, Inc. for TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Document filed by TradeStation Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Jackson, Richard)
February 9, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Richard Bryan Jackson to RE-FILE Document (97 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 60 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 54 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 106 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 62 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 120 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 81 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 138 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 62 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 191 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 442 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 21 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 34 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 210 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 192 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 148 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 44 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 58 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 123 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 120 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 99 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 54 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 87 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 33 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 55 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 45 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 109 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 175 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 375 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 104 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 53 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 144 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 116 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 169 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 107 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 91 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 497 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 36 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 599 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 51 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were only added to 11-md-2296. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). NOTE: YOU MUST SELECT THE FILER FOR EACH INDIVIDUAL CASE Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lb)
February 9, 2012 Filing 600 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Richard J. Holwell is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(sjo)
February 9, 2012 Filing 599 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TradeStation Group, Other Affiliate Monex Group, Inc. for TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Document filed by TradeStation Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Jackson, Richard) Modified on 2/10/2012 (lb).
February 8, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Anthony C. Valiulis to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. [488 (in 11-md-2296, and all consolidated actions)] Motion Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(db)
February 8, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Shawn M. Staples to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. [487 (11-md-2296, and all consolidated actions)] Motion Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(db)
February 8, 2012 Filing 598 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Neuberger Berman Inc.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2012 Filing 597 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Dreyfus Basic S&P 500 Stock Index Fund. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2012 Filing 596 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Dreyfus Active Midcap Fund. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2012 Filing 595 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Goldentree Multistrategy Ltd.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2012 Filing 594 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION of Anthony C. Valiulis for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Valiulis, Anthony) Modified on 2/9/2012 (db).
February 8, 2012 Filing 593 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION of Shawn M. Staples for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Staples, Shawn) Modified on 2/9/2012 (db).
February 7, 2012 Filing 592 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by M&T Bank. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2012 Filing 591 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Michael Loeb. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2012 Filing 590 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Commerz Markets LLC. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2012 Filing 589 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Citigroup Securities Services Inc.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2012 Filing 588 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Bell Atlantic Master Trust. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2012 Filing 587 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank J Morales on behalf of Automotive Machinists Pension Trust Fund, MICHAEL HENDRICKSON, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry, Michael Parmalee Welfare and Pension Administration Inc Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Morales, Frank)
February 2, 2012 Filing 586 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MB Financial, Inc. for MB Financial Bank, N.A.. Document filed by MB Financial Bank, N.A..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Dahl, James)
February 1, 2012 Filing 585 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 31, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Jeffrey Fourmaux Document #582 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Richard J. Holwell for approval. (dt)
January 30, 2012 Filing 584 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of December 28, 2011 Stay Order. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas. (Burgo, Paul)
January 30, 2012 Filing 583 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian J Hurst on behalf of Southwest Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Hurst, Brian)
January 30, 2012 Filing 582 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) The Blackstone Group LP. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/31/2012 (dt).
January 27, 2012 Filing 581 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hudson Bay Fund LP, Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04538-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Momborquette, David)
January 27, 2012 Filing 580 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Hudson Bay Fund LP, Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04538-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Blase, Kristie)
January 27, 2012 Filing 579 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Keith Momborquette on behalf of Hudson Bay Fund LP, Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04538-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Momborquette, David)
January 27, 2012 Filing 578 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tata Steel Limited, Corporate Parent Tata Steel Ijmuiden B.V., Corporate Parent Corus Group Limited, Corporate Parent Tata Steel Europe Limited, Corporate Parent Tata Global Holdings Pte. Ltd for Stichting Pensioenfonds Hoogovens. Document filed by Stichting Pensioenfonds Hoogovens.(Martin, D.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 577 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Christopher Greene, Jr on behalf of Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC (Greene, Stephen)
January 27, 2012 Filing 576 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Stichting Pensioenfonds OCE.(Martin, D.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 575 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Stichting Pensioenfonds VAN DE ABN AMRO N.V..(Martin, D.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 574 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn.(Martin, D.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 573 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Stichting Pensioenfonds Hoogovens (Martin, D.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 572 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Stichting Pensioenfonds OCE (Martin, D.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 571 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Stichting Pensioenfonds VAN DE ABN AMRO N.V. (Martin, D.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 570 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by D. Ross Martin on behalf of Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn (Martin, D.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 569 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meghan E George on behalf of Southwest Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(George, Meghan)
January 27, 2012 Filing 568 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HFA Holdings Limited for Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC. Document filed by Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC.(Nathan, David)
January 27, 2012 Filing 567 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Nathan on behalf of Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC (Nathan, David)
January 27, 2012 Filing 566 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of Swiss Re Financial Products Corp. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Blase, Kristie)
January 27, 2012 Filing 565 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Keith Momborquette on behalf of Swiss Re Financial Products Corp. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Momborquette, David)
January 27, 2012 Filing 564 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Kennedy Dodds on behalf of Amida Capital Management LLC, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Clearwater Investment, Pacific Select Fund, Walker House SPV Ltd. (Dodds, William)
January 27, 2012 Filing 563 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cheryl Lynette Davis on behalf of Charles Pratt & Company LLC (Davis, Cheryl)
January 27, 2012 Filing 562 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rodman E. Honecker on behalf of Adaly Opportunity Fund, L.P., The Strategic Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. (Honecker, Rodman)
January 26, 2012 Filing 561 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Noah Paykin on behalf of Abigail Wallach (Paykin, Joseph)
January 26, 2012 Filing 560 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by T. Rowe Price Balanced Fund, Inc. (incorrectly named as "T. Rowe Price Balanced Fund - Large Cap Core"), T. Rowe Price Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Equity Series, Inc., T. Rowe Price Mid-Cap Value Fund, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Elliott, Mark)
January 26, 2012 Filing 559 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Michael Elliott on behalf of T. Rowe Price Balanced Fund, Inc. (incorrectly named as "T. Rowe Price Balanced Fund - Large Cap Core"), T. Rowe Price Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Equity Series, Inc., T. Rowe Price Mid-Cap Value Fund, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Elliott, Mark)
January 25, 2012 Filing 558 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of RIEF RMP LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, RIEF Trading LLC, RIEF Trading LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, Perry Corp., Perry Partners L.P., Griffith E. Madigan, Ellen Jackson, Marilyn Rapkin, Robert Bosau, Rose T Bosau, Kenneth Cahn(as Trustee of the Dorothy Cahn Trust UAD 7/3/1982), Kenneth Cahn(as an individual and as a Trustee of the Dorothy Cahn Trust UAD 07/03/1981), Stephanie Cahn, Cantigny Foundation, Ford Motor Company, HFR Asset Mgmt LLC, HFR RVA COMBINED MASTER TR, KENNETH CAHN TR UA 07/03/81 DOROTHY CAHN, BRUCE KIRKPATRICK, John M Lavine, John W. Madigan, Mark W Madigan, Stephanie A Madigan, PEAK6 PERFORMANCE MANAGEMENT LLC, ROBERT R MCCORMICK FOUNDATION, Salvation Army Central Territorial, The Dorothy Cahn Trust UAD 7/3/1981, The Dorothy Cahn Trust UAD 7/3/1982, Kathryn Vorisek, Steven Rapkin Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Bohan, David)
January 25, 2012 Filing 557 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dexia S.A. for Dexia Credit Local, New York Branch. Document filed by Dexia Credit Local, New York Branch.(Cummings, Charles)
January 25, 2012 Filing 556 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Bart Cummings on behalf of Dexia Credit Local, New York Branch (Cummings, Charles)
January 25, 2012 Filing 555 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ice Bear Incorporated.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Haider, Shan)
January 25, 2012 Filing 554 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank for Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc.. Document filed by Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc..(Alfonso, Ana)
January 25, 2012 Filing 553 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ana M. Alfonso on behalf of Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc. (Alfonso, Ana)
January 24, 2012 Filing 552 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mutual of America Life Insurance Company for Mutual Of Amer Life Ins COA/C Equity-Index Fund, Mutual of America Capital Management Corp., Mutual of America Investment Corp., Mutual of America Investment Corp. Equity Index Fund. Document filed by Mutual Of Amer Life Ins COA/C Equity-Index Fund, Mutual of America Capital Management Corp., Mutual of America Investment Corp., Mutual of America Investment Corp. Equity Index Fund.(Crisp, Martin)
January 24, 2012 Filing 551 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin Jonathan Crisp on behalf of Mutual Of Amer Life Ins COA/C Equity-Index Fund, Mutual of America Investment Corp., Mutual of America Investment Corp. Equity Index Fund, Mutual of America Capital Management Corp. (Crisp, Martin)
January 24, 2012 Filing 550 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by QVT Financial LP, QVT Fund LP, Quintessence Fund, LP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Gussman, William)
January 24, 2012 Filing 549 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristie Marie Blase on behalf of QVT Financial LP, QVT Fund LP, Quintessence Fund, LP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Blase, Kristie)
January 24, 2012 Filing 548 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Hayward Gussman, Jr on behalf of QVT Financial LP, QVT Fund LP, Quintessence Fund, LP Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Gussman, William)
January 24, 2012 Filing 547 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nannette Rachelle Kelleher on behalf of Phoebe P. Bender, Matthew Bender IV (Kelleher, Nannette)
January 23, 2012 Filing 546 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Paul Lobel on behalf of E*Trade Clearing LLC (Lobel, Douglas)
January 20, 2012 Filing 545 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Harris Hesekiel on behalf of Mary F. Brown, William J. Brown (Hesekiel, Todd)
January 20, 2012 Filing 544 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Arrow Distressed Securities Fund.(Baer, Henry)
January 19, 2012 Filing 543 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Adaly Investment Management Co. served on 12/23/2011, answer due 1/13/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 19, 2012 Filing 542 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Strategic Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. served on 12/23/2011, answer due 1/13/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 19, 2012 Filing 541 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Adaly Opportunity Fund, L.P. served on 12/23/2011, answer due 1/13/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 19, 2012 Filing 540 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Royal Trust Corporation of Canada served on 12/22/2011, answer due 1/12/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 19, 2012 Filing 539 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Arrow Distressed Securities Fund served on 12/22/2011, answer due 1/12/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 19, 2012 Filing 538 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. E*Trade Clearing LLC served on 12/20/2011, answer due 1/10/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 19, 2012 Filing 537 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dynamic Domestic Fund LP served on 1/6/2012, answer due 1/27/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 19, 2012 Filing 536 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. William J. Brown served on 1/9/2012, answer due 1/30/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 18, 2012 Filing 535 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Henry P. Baer, Jr on behalf of Arrow Distressed Securities Fund (Baer, Henry)
January 13, 2012 Filing 534 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent APG Asset Management, Corporate Parent Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP for ABP Investments US, Inc.. Document filed by ABP Investments US, Inc..(Crisp, Martin)
January 13, 2012 Filing 533 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP.(Crisp, Martin)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER REGARDING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: All attorneys appearing in these cases must be admitted to practice in this court in accordance with Local Civil Rule 1.3. Attorneys seeking admission pro hac vice should follow the Court's instructions at http:www.nysd.uscourts.gov/pro_hac.php with the following exceptions: 1) Service of the motion on all parties is not required. 2) An admission fee is not required. 3) An ECF password may be obtained before pro hac vice admission is granted. Where the online application requires an admission date, applicants may use the date on which they first entered their appearance in the case. For assistance with the ECF tiling system, or with applying for admission pro hac vice, counsel may contact the Court's ECF Help Desk at 212-805-0800. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(mro)
January 12, 2012 Filing 531 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel M. Miller on behalf of Value Line Inc. (Miller, Joel)
January 10, 2012 Filing 530 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Value Line Inc..(Huene, Claire)
January 10, 2012 Filing 529 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claire L. Huene on behalf of Value Line Inc. (Huene, Claire)
January 10, 2012 Filing 528 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Stay Order)(Doniak, Christine)
January 9, 2012 Filing 527 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn served on 11/16/2011, answer due 12/7/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2012 Filing 526 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Stichting Pensioenfonds VAN DE ABN AMRO N.V. served on 11/15/2011, answer due 12/6/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2012 Filing 525 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Stichting Pensioenfonds OCE served on 11/21/2011, answer due 12/12/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2012 Filing 524 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Stichting Pensioenfonds Hoogovens served on 11/15/2011, answer due 12/6/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2012 Filing 523 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP served on 11/15/2011, answer due 12/6/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2012 Filing 522 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Doniak, Christine)
January 9, 2012 Filing 521 DECLARATION of Jeffrey C. Fourmaux as to Mailing of Service Documents on 1/6/12. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH, 1:11-cv-04784-RJH(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2012 Filing 520 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT served on MITSUBISHI UFJ ASSET MGMT #XX8364 on DECEMBER 30, 2011. Service was accepted by YVETTE ROMAN. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Owens, Ronald)
January 6, 2012 Filing 519 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT served on MITSUBISHI UFJ ASSET MANAGEMENT, LTD on DECEMBER 30, 2011. Service was accepted by YVETTE ROMAN. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Owens, Ronald)
January 6, 2012 Filing 518 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION and SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT served on MITSUBISHI UFJ on DECEMBER 30, 2011. Service was accepted by YVETTE ROMAN. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Owens, Ronald)
January 5, 2012 Filing 517 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice solely against the defendant(s) Intesa Sanpaolo. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/3/2012) (tro)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 516 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE AND ORDER: Charles E. Enloe will no longer be employed by the Office of the Attorney General of the State of New York and, accordingly, hereby withdraws as counsel for Defendant NEW YORK STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM in the above-captioned action, and requests that his appearance herein be terminated. SO ORDERED. Attorney Charles Ethan Enloe terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/3/2012) (tro)
January 4, 2012 Filing 515 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Trinity Derivatives Group LLC served on 12/20/2011, answer due 1/10/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 4, 2012 Filing 514 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Christian Brothers Investment Services, Inc. served on 12/29/2011, answer due 1/19/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
January 4, 2012 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (135 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJH) Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(lmb)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER: The court wishes to facilitate the filing of documents under seal in all cases that are, or will be, consolidated in this matter, in which a protective order was previously entered. Accordingly, the court hereby adopts in each such case any protective order which was in effect at the time of transfer. The court will provide a supplemental order identifying the adopted protective orders by docket number once all case dockets have been fully transferred to this court. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(lmb)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER: Pursuant to Standing Order M10-468, many of the cases in the above- captioned multidistrict litigation have been automatically designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the "Pilot Project"). However, because this court has stayed nearly all discovery and motion practice in these cases (see Order of December 28,2011 (the "Stay")), inclusion in the Pilot Project would be inappropriate. The court hereby designates that these cases shall not be included in the Pilot Project at this time. The court will revisit inclusion upon further order from this court or from the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware lifting the Stay. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(lmb)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER: Accordingly, the court hereby STAYS these consolidated cases, as well as any future cases consolidated under this docket number, pending further order of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware or this court. The times stayed include, but arc not limited to, any deadline for a defendant to respond to a complaint or to commence motion practice, and any period for objection or reply to a filed motion. The stay does not bar, but instead permits plaintiffs to (a) move for leave to further amend a complaint: (b) voluntarily dismiss an action or one or more defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Ci vil Procedure 41; or (c) move to add or drop a party or to sever any claim against a party pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21. The stay does not bar defendants from objecting to any such motion by plaintiffs. The stay does not bar any party from moving the court to vacate or modify this order, or from responding to such a motion. The stay does not bar counsel from moving the court for admission pro hac vice. The court hereby waives the fee requirement for such motions. Notwithstanding this stay, all defendants or their counsel who have not already appeared in a case shall enter an appearance within 30 days after the latter of entry of this Order or service or an amended complaint upon defendants, without prejudice to any defenses or positions that defendants may have. Counsel who entered an appearance in a ease prior to its transfer do not need to enter a new appearance. All counsel are directed to apply for an ECF password issued by this Court. Please visit the Court's website at nysd.uscourts.gov to complete the on-line registration form. For assistance with the FCF filing system, or with applying for admission pro hac vice, counsel should contact the Court's FeF Help Desk, at 212-805-0800. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(js)
December 23, 2011 Filing 510 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Leeda Management Services (Cayman) LTD served on 11/1/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
December 22, 2011 Filing 509 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald William Meister on behalf of Kurt Adler Estate (Meister, Ronald)
December 22, 2011 Filing 508 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Geraldo Rivera served on 12/16/2011, answer due 1/6/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 22, 2011 Filing 507 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Anna Livingstone served on 12/7/2011, answer due 12/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 22, 2011 Filing 506 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amida Capital Management LLC served on 12/12/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 21, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #501 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $400.00, paid on 12/13/2011, Receipt Number 1024131,1024133. (jd)
December 20, 2011 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:11-md-02296-RJH. (sjo)
December 20, 2011 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-md-02296-RJH. (sjo)
December 19, 2011 Filing 505 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT served on BANK OF TOKYO - MISTUBISHI UFJ TRUST COMPANY on 12/19/2011. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Owens, Ronald)
December 19, 2011 Filing 504 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Baldwin Enterprises, Inc. served on 12/14/2011, answer due 1/4/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 19, 2011 Filing 503 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. RIEF Trading LLC served on 12/14/2011, answer due 1/4/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 16, 2011 Filing 502 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Russell DuVall on behalf of Helena Pai, Paul Pai, Paul Pai & Helena Pai Joint Tenant (DuVall, Richard)
December 15, 2011 Filing 500 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. ABN AMRO Clearing Chicago LLC served on 12/1/2011, answer due 12/22/2011; Fortis Clearing Americas LLC 695 served on 12/1/2011, answer due 12/22/2011. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Owens, Ronald)
December 15, 2011 Filing 499 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GSS LLC.(Speed, Mark)
December 15, 2011 Filing 498 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Damian Speed on behalf of GSS LLC (Speed, Mark)
December 15, 2011 Filing 497 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. T. Rowe Price Equity Income Fund served on 11/17/2011, answer due 12/8/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 15, 2011 Filing 496 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC served on 12/6/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 15, 2011 Filing 495 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd served on 12/12/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 15, 2011 Filing 494 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Saritha Chandrupatla Reddy on behalf of Cedar Grove Cemetery Association Perpetual Care. New Address: PRYOR CASHMAN LLP, 7 TIMES SQUARE, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA 10036, 212-421-4100. (Reddy, Saritha)
December 15, 2011 Filing 493 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Saritha Chandrupatla Reddy on behalf of Cedar Grove Cemetery Association Perpetual Care (Reddy, Saritha)
December 15, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney David Zensky Document #491 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Richard J. Holwell for approval. (dt)
December 14, 2011 Filing 492 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Decommissioning Trust, R.E. Ginna Qualified Decommissioning Trust.(Mordkoff, David)
December 14, 2011 Filing 491 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Intesa Sanpaolo. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David) Modified on 12/15/2011 (dt).
December 13, 2011 Filing 501 MOTION for Tom Van Arsdel and Justin Whitley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., Adaly Opportunity Fund, L.P., Strategic Opportunity BMO Nesbitt Burns C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., The Strategic Opportunities Master Fund, L.P..(bwa)
December 13, 2011 Filing 490 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York State Insurance Fund served on 12/9/2011, answer due 12/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 13, 2011 Filing 489 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Maria Markowitz served on 11/22/2011, answer due 12/13/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 13, 2011 Filing 488 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jerome Markowitz served on 11/22/2011, answer due 12/13/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 13, 2011 Filing 487 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L served on 12/6/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 13, 2011 Filing 486 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. DEPFA Bank PLC((Hypo Real Estate Bank Int'l)) served on 12/6/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 13, 2011 Filing 485 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dexia Credit Local, New York Branch served on 12/6/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 13, 2011 Filing 484 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jamie A. Simins served on 11/30/2011, answer due 12/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 13, 2011 Filing 483 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert A. Simins served on 11/30/2011, answer due 12/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 9, 2011 Filing 482 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Blue Chip Fund, a series of First Investors Equity Funds.(Miller, Richard)
December 9, 2011 Filing 481 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard S. Miller on behalf of Blue Chip Fund, a series of First Investors Equity Funds (Miller, Richard)
December 8, 2011 Filing 480 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry W. Lipman on behalf of Charles E. Hugel (Lipman, Harry)
December 8, 2011 Filing 479 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Value Line Asset Management served on 12/2/2011, answer due 12/23/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 8, 2011 Filing 478 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Value Line Income Fund served on 12/2/2011, answer due 12/23/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 8, 2011 Filing 477 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert M. Treboux served on 11/28/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 8, 2011 Filing 476 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alissa Schechter Wright on behalf of New York Estate Teacher's Retirement System (Wright, Alissa)
December 7, 2011 Filing 475 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Martin Jonathan Crisp on behalf of ABP Investments US, Inc., Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP. New Address: Ropes & Gray LLP, 1211 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, USA 10036, (212) 596-9000. (Crisp, Martin)
December 7, 2011 Filing 474 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Direxion Funds.(Miller, Richard)
December 7, 2011 Filing 473 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard S. Miller on behalf of Direxion Funds (Miller, Richard)
December 6, 2011 Filing 469 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Sandelman Partners Multi-Strategy Master Fund, LTD served on 11/29/2011, answer due 12/20/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 6, 2011 Filing 468 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fairweather Limited Partnership served on 11/22/2011, answer due 12/13/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 6, 2011 Filing 467 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Kurt Adler Estate served on 11/29/2011, answer due 12/20/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 6, 2011 Filing 466 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Julia K. Rosenwald served on 11/28/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 6, 2011 Filing 465 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Pond View Credit (Master) L.P. served on 11/23/2011, answer due 12/14/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 6, 2011 Filing 464 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Phoebe P. Bender served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 6, 2011 Filing 463 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Matthew Bender IV served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
December 2, 2011 Filing 472 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander D. Solon, Paula Solon appearing Pro Se. (mro)
December 2, 2011 Filing 471 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander D. Solon appearing Pro Se. (mro)
December 2, 2011 Filing 470 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paula Solon appearing Pro Se. (mro)
December 2, 2011 Filing 462 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin Jonathan Crisp on behalf of ABP Investments US, Inc., Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP (Crisp, Martin)
November 30, 2011 Filing 461 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Greenock Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd. served on 11/19/2011, answer due 12/12/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 30, 2011 Filing 460 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Multi-Strategy Greenock Master Fund Ltd served on 11/19/2011, answer due 12/12/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 30, 2011 Filing 459 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Helena Pai served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 30, 2011 Filing 458 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Paul Pai & Helena Pai Joint Tenant served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 30, 2011 Filing 457 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Paul Pai served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 30, 2011 Filing 456 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. T. Rowe Price Mid-Cap Value Fund, Inc. served on 11/17/2011, answer due 12/8/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 30, 2011 Filing 455 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. T. Rowe Price Equity Series, Inc. served on 11/17/2011, answer due 12/8/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 30, 2011 Filing 454 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Binhua Mao served on 11/17/2011, answer due 12/8/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 29, 2011 Filing 453 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Charles Pratt & Company LLC served on 11/16/2011, answer due 12/7/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 29, 2011 Filing 452 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Caxton Associates LP served on 11/16/2011, answer due 12/7/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 29, 2011 Filing 451 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Royal Bank of Canada served on 11/16/2011, answer due 12/7/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 29, 2011 Filing 450 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie G Wheeler on behalf of Towerview LLC (Wheeler, Stephanie)
November 28, 2011 Filing 449 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Richard Hellman on behalf of Harvey Bookman (Hellman, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2011 Filing 448 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of New Eagle Holdings LLC (Mordkoff, David)
November 23, 2011 Filing 447 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Frischer on behalf of New Eagle Holdings LLC (Frischer, Harry)
November 23, 2011 Filing 446 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Iolaire Investors LLP.(Ratner, Stephen)
November 23, 2011 Filing 445 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New Eagle Holdings LLC, New Eagle Holdings LLC Risk Arbitrage.(Ratner, Stephen)
November 23, 2011 Filing 444 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of New Eagle Holdings LLC (Ratner, Stephen)
November 22, 2011 Filing 443 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. SS&C TECHNOLOGIES HOLDINGS, INC.; served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 22, 2011 Filing 442 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Leslie Payne served on 11/14/2011, answer due 12/5/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 22, 2011 Filing 441 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Violet Payne served on 11/14/2011, answer due 12/5/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 22, 2011 Filing 440 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lawrence B. Buttenwieser, Esq. served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 22, 2011 Filing 439 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Charles E. Hugel served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 22, 2011 Filing 438 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Alexander Solon served on 11/15/2011, answer due 12/6/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 22, 2011 Filing 437 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Paula Solon served on 11/15/2011, answer due 12/6/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 21, 2011 Filing 436 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties dated October 21, 2011, Plaintiffs Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for a certain series of Senior Notes, and Wilmington Trust Company, in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the PHONES notes, hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant Anchin Block & Anchin LLP, who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/16/2011) (ft)
November 18, 2011 Filing 435 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. EAC Management LP served on 11/11/2011, answer due 12/2/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 434 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mary F. Brown served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 433 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lori Banner Kupferberg served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 432 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Barry David Kupferberg served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 431 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. O'Shaughnessy Asset Management, LLC served on 11/10/2011, answer due 12/1/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 430 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. O' Shaugnessy served on 11/10/2011, answer due 12/1/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 429 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. James P. O'Shaughnessy served on 11/10/2011, answer due 12/1/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 428 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. SS&C Technologies, Inc. served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 427 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Carret Asset Management served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 426 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Harvey Bookman served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 425 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cedar Grove Cemetery Association Perpetual Care served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 424 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 423 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ernest W. Michel served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 422 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. John R. Polatschek TOD served on 11/10/2011, answer due 12/1/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 421 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. EAC Partners Master Fund LTD served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 420 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amici Fund International LTD served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 419 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Porter Orlin LLC served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 418 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Collectors Fund served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 417 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Sterne Agee & Leach Inc. served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 416 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Towerview LLC served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 415 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Putnam Lovell NBF Securities Inc. served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 414 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fredric Levenson served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 413 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dorothy A. Levenson served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 412 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Westchester Capital Management served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 411 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The New York Province of the Society of Jesus served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 410 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mary Jane F. Moeller Trust U/A/D 8/7/2006 served on 11/10/2011, answer due 12/1/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 409 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mary Jane F. Moeller served on 11/10/2011, answer due 12/1/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 408 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amici Qualified Associates served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 407 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amici Associates LP served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 406 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD U.S. Large Cap Value Fund served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 405 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD U.S. Index Fund served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 404 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Securities S&P 500 Index Fund served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 403 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Securities Inc. served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 402 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Emerald U.S. Market Index Fund served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 401 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Emerald Pooled U.S. Fund served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 400 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. T.D. Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity Pooled Fund Trust served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 399 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Asset Management USA Inc. served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 398 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Systeia Capital Management served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 397 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York State Insurance Fund served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 396 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 395 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City District Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 394 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. LYRA Capital LLC served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 393 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Intesa Sanpaolo served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 392 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Institutional Benchmarks Series (Master Feeder) Limited served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 391 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Evolution All-Cap Equity Fund served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 390 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Direxion Funds served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 389 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amundi Investment Advisors USA, Inc. served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 15, 2011 Filing 388 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Madlyn Gleich Primoff on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Primoff, Madlyn)
November 15, 2011 Filing 387 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jane W. Parver on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Parver, Jane)
November 15, 2011 Filing 386 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Matthew Boglioli on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Boglioli, Daniel)
November 14, 2011 Filing 385 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hypo Real Estate Holding AG for HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L. Document filed by HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L.(Kane, Rachel)
November 14, 2011 Filing 384 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Brothman Kane on behalf of HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L (Kane, Rachel)
November 14, 2011 Filing 383 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Celia Goldwag Barenholtz on behalf of HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L (Barenholtz, Celia)
November 14, 2011 Filing 382 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ralph Gerard Reiser on behalf of Dorothy A. Levenson, Fredric Levenson (Reiser, Ralph)
November 12, 2011 Filing 381 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Royal Bank of Canada for James P. O'Shaughnessy, O'Shaughnessy Asset Management, LLC. Document filed by James P. O'Shaughnessy, O'Shaughnessy Asset Management, LLC.(Miller, Hilary)
November 12, 2011 Filing 380 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hilary B. Miller on behalf of James P. O'Shaughnessy, O'Shaughnessy Asset Management, LLC (Miller, Hilary)
November 8, 2011 Filing 378 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald Mark Badaczewski on behalf of ITG Inc., Investment Tech Group Inc. (Badaczewski, Donald)
November 8, 2011 Filing 377 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ITG Inc., Investment Tech Group Inc..(Tabak, Daniel)
November 8, 2011 Filing 376 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Hershel Tabak on behalf of ITG Inc., Investment Tech Group Inc. (Tabak, Daniel)
November 4, 2011 Filing 375 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alfred N. Metz on behalf of Robert A. Simins Jtwors, Jamie A. Simins Jtwros (Metz, Alfred)
November 4, 2011 Filing 374 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. George M. Moss served on 10/12/2011, answer due 11/2/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 4, 2011 Filing 373 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. William Sanderson Twaddell served on 10/19/2011, answer due 11/9/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
November 4, 2011 Filing 372 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Clearwater Investment Trust.(Kessenick, Scott)
November 4, 2011 Filing 371 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Clearwater Investment Trust (Kessenick, Scott)
October 31, 2011 Filing 370 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami re: Mailing of Service Documents on 10/28/11. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 28, 2011 Filing 379 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1IA SPX1, ABN AMRO Clearing Chicago LLC, ABP, ABP Investments US, Inc., ASB Advisors LLC, Adaly Investment Management Co., Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., Adaly Opportunity Fund, L.P., Alexander D and Paula Solon JTWROS, Alexander Solon Irra FBO Alexander Solon C/O MLPF&S Cust FPO, Alexandra Global Master Fund LTD, Alson Cap Partners LLC/ Alson Signature FD Offshore M&C Corporate Services Ltd., Alson Capital Partners, LLC, Alson Signature Fund Offshore Portfolio, Ltd, Amalgamated Bank, Amici Associates LP, Amici Fund International LTD, Amici Qualified Associates, Amida Capital Management LLC, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Amundi Investment Advisors USA, Inc., Anchin Block & Anchin, Anima Societa DI Gestione, Anima Societa DI Gestione Del Risparmio Per Azioni, Anima Societa' Di Gestione C/O BPM Capital Trust GSS LLC, Archdiocese Of New York Master Trust, Arrow Distressed Securities Fund, B Trade Services LLC, BMO Nesbit Burns Inc., BMO Nesbit Burns Inc./CDS, BMO Nesbit Burns Trading Corp. SA, BPM Capital Trust, Bakery CONF TOB WRKS Local 102, Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers & Grain Millers Union Local 102, Baldwin Enterprises, Inc., Bank of Tokyo - Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Barry Kupferberg David & Lori Banner Kupferberg JT TEN, Bell Atlantic Master Trust, Phoebe P. Bender, Matthew Bender IV, Bessemer Trust Company, Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd., Blue Chip Fund, a series of First Investors Life Series Funds, Harvey Bookman, Bram Fierstein Gen Par, Mary F. Brown, William J. Brown, Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Brown Brothers Harriman and Company/ETF, Lawrence B. Buttenwieser, Esq., CBS Master Trust, CEDE & Co C/O Depository Trust Company, CEDE & Co.,, CIM XVI LLC, Capitalia Asset Management SGR S.P.A., Capitalia Azionario USA, Capitalia Azionario USA C/O Capitalia AM SGR SPA C/O Unicredit S.P.A., Carret Asset Management, Caxton Associates LP, Cedar Grove Cemetery Association Perpetual Care, Nicholas G. Chantiles, Vilma L. Chantilles, Charles Pratt & Company LLC, Cheetah & Co., Christian Brothers Investment Services, Inc., Citadel Equity Fund Ltd., Citadel LLC, Citi Goldentree, LTD, Citigroup Securities Services Inc., Joan E. Clark, Clearwater Investment, Clearwater Investment Trust, Cogent Management Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Commerzbank AG, Consolidated Edison Of NY K801, Convertibles Strategic Hold, Cougar Trading, LLC, Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., D E Shaw Valence Portfolio LLC, DBSO Securities Ltd., DELOS Insurance Company, DEPFA Bank PLC((Hypo Real Estate Bank Int'l)), DEPFA Bank PLC, Delaware Charter G & T TTEE, Deleware Charter Guarantee & Trust CO., Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Depository Trust Company, Dexia Bank, Dexia Bank C/O Dexia Credit Local, Dexia Credit Local, New York Branch, John Doe(as Trustee of TD Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity Pooled Fund Trust), John Doe(as Trustee of GMIMCO Trust), John Doe(as Trustee of Epstein Family Revocable Trust), John Doe(as Beneficiary and/or Distributee of Kurt Alder Estate), John Doe(as Administrator of TRE Pension EFT Account Pension Payment System), John Doe, John Doe(as Custodian of Thomas J. Majorana CGM IRA), John Doe(as Trustee of L3 Communications Corporation Master Trust), John Doe(as Trustee for T. Rowe Price Equity Income Trust), John Doe(as Administrator of Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers & Grain Millers Local 102 Pension Fund), John Doe(as Owner of Mergers Investment Trading Account Long), John Doe(as Trustee of CBS Master Trust), John Doe(as Trustee for R.E. Ginna Qualified Decommissioning Trust), John Doe(as Beneficiary and/or Distributee of Nancy G. Lezette Estate), John Doe(as Administrator of Empire State Carpenters Pension), John Doe(as Successor Trustee of Himan Brown Revocable Trust), John Doe(as Administrator of Hears Equity Appreciation Plan), John Doe(as Administrator of New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund), Does 1-5,000, Drawbridge Global Macro, Master Fund Ltd-K, Dresdner Bank, AG, Dreyfus Active Midcap Fund, Dreyfus Basic S&P 500 Stock Index Fund, Dreyfus Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus S&P 500 Stock Index Fund, Dreyfus/Laurel Funds Inc, Dynamic Domestic Fund LP, E*Trade Clearing LLC, E-Connectivity AVG PX, EAC Management LP, EAC Partners Master Fund LTD, Emanuel E. Geduld 2005 Family Trust, Empire State Carpenters Pension, Epstein Family Revocable Trust, Equity League Pension Trust Fund, Evergreen Asset Management C/O Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., Evergreen Asset Management Corp., Evolution All-Cap Equity Fund, Hugh F. Fagan, Peter Fairweather, Fairweather Family L.P., Fairweather LTD PTRSHP R1F3154C Custodian, Fairweather Limited Partnership, Fideuram Bank Luxembourg S.A., Fideuram Bank Luxembourg S.A. C/O Intesa Sanpaolo, Ian Fierstein, Jesse Fierstein, Micah Fierstein, Bram Fierstein, Fierstein Company, First Investors Life Series Fund Blue Chip Series, First Investors Life Series Fund Utilities Series, First Investors Utilities Income, Firstar Trust Company, Flexible US Equity Managers, Flexible US Equity Managers Portfolio 1 LLC, Folksamerica Reinsurance Company, Fordham University, Fortis Clearing Americas LLC 695, Foulard and Co., GDK INC., GMIMCO Trust (General Motors Investment Management Corp.), GMIMCO Trust (General Motors) Bruce Marquand, GSS LLC, Mario J. Gabelli, Gabelli & Company Inc., Gabelli Asset Management Company, Gabelli Average Price 2, Gabelli Equity Trust, Inc., Gabelli Foundation, Inc., Gabelli Funds, Inc., Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Gabelli Funds Inc.) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Gabelli) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (The Gabelli Asset Fund) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (The Gabelli Global Multimed TR) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc.(Gabelli ABC Fund), Gabelli Funds, LLC, Gabelli Global Deal Fund, Gabelli Securities, Inc., Gabelli Value Fund, Inc., Gamco Asset Management Inc., Gamco Investors Inc., Cara Leigh Gillespie-Wilson, Ciri Gillispie, Goldentree Asset Management LP, Goldentree Master Fund II, Ltd, Goldentree Master Fund Ltd., Goldentree Multistrategy LTD, Goldentree Multistrategy Offshore Fund, Governing Council of the University of Toronto, Government Of Singapore Investment Corp PTE LTD, Greenock Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd., Ruth Gruenthal, Emanuel Gruss, Gryphon Hidden Values VIII LTD, HFF I LLC, HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L, Havens Partners Enhanced Fund, L.P., Havens Partners, L.P., Hearst Equity Appreciation Plan, Helen Buttenwieser Trust 7/28/38, Himan Brown Revocable Trust, Himan Brown, TR UA 11/20/02 Himan Brown Revocable Trust, David L. Hoexter, Homeland and Insurance Company of New York, Polly H. Howells, Hudson Bay Fund LP, Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd., Charles E. Hugel, IBEW Local 25 Master Trust Plan, ITG Inc., Ian Fierstein Gen Par, Instinet Corp NY, Institutional Benchmarks Series (Master Feeder) Limited, Institutional Benchmarks Series (Master Feeder) Limited C/O LYRA Capital LLC, Intesa Sanpaolo, Investment Tech Group Inc., Iolaire Investors LLP, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jerome & Maria Markowitz JTWROS, Jesse Fierstein Gen Par, John J. and Rosemary Wagner JTWROS, Jonathan A. Knee, Barry David Kupferberg, Lori Banner Kupferberg, Kurt Adler Estate, L3 Communication Corporation Master Trust, LYRA Capital LLC, Robert E. LaBlanc, LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC, Leavitt J. Pope Estate, Leeda Management Services (Cayman) LTD, Legg Mason Partners, Lenox Hill Hospital, Dorothy A. Levenson, Fredric Levenson, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC, Lighthouse Partners, LLC, Lincoln FD Tax Advantage, Anna Livingstone, Local 102 Pension/NO TR VAL IM, Michael Loeb, Loeb Arbitrage Management LP, M&T Bank, M. Safra & Co., Inc., MACM 8, Madison Square Large-Cap Enhanced Index Fund LP, Thomas J. Majorana, Binhua Mao, Margaret T.M. Jones CP & CO AC, Mario J. Gabelli Gamco Investors Inc., Jerome Markowitz, Maria Markowitz, Mary Jane F. Moeller Trust U/A/D 8/7/2006, Master Trust Bank of Japan LTD, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Micah Fierstein Gen Par, Ernest W. Michel, Mid Atlantic Capital Corp., Millenco LLC, Mitsubishi UFJ, Mitsubishi UFJ Asset MGMT #968364 (Through Master Trust Bank Of Japan)C/O Bank Of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Mitsubishi UFJ Asset Management LTD, Mitzuho Bank, Ltd., Mary Jane F. Moeller, Monetary Authority of Singapore, George M. Moss, Mr Violet and Mrs Leslie Payne Jtwros, Multi-Strategy Greenock Master Fund Ltd, Mutual Of Amer Life Ins COA/C Equity-Index Fund, Mutual of America Investment Corp., Mutual of America Investment Corp. Equity Index Fund, NYC District Council Carpenters Pension, NYC District Council Carpenters Welfare, Nancy G. Lezette Estate, Natixis Bleichroeder LLC, Neuberger Berman Inc., New Eagle Holdings LLC, New Eagle Holdings LLC Risk Arbitrage, New York City Deferred Compensation Plan, New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, New York Estate Teacher's Retirement System, New York State Insurance Fund, Newedge USA, LLC, Newedge USA, LLC, Equity Clearing Division, Nomura Securities International, Inc., O' Shaugnessy, James P. O'Shaughnessy, O'Shaughnessy Asset Management, LLC, Traits Omni, Pacific Select, Pacific Select Fund, Helena Pai, Paul Pai, Paris Trading, Paul Pai & Helena Pai Joint Tenant, Leslie Payne, Violet Payne, Pension Commingle Fund, SWAPS, SBI, Pension Fund Association for Local Government Officials, Pension Trust Fund Local Union#27, John R. Polatschek TOD, Pond View Credit (Master) L.P., Martha P. Pope, Martha P. Pope(Executrix, Estate of Leavitt J. Pope), Porter Orlin LLC, Portfolio 1 Offshore Master LP LSV C/O GS & CO, Putnam Lovell NBF Securities Inc., QES QVT Fund LP, QVT Financial LP, QVT Fund, Quintessence Fund, LP, R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master, R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Decommissioning Trust, R.E. Ginna Qualified Decommissioning Trust, RIEF RMP LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, RIEF Trading LLC, RIEF Trading LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, Renaissance Technologies LLC, Risk
October 28, 2011 Filing 369 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
October 28, 2011 Filing 368 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Joseph Brown on behalf of Fierstein Company (Brown, Stephen)
October 28, 2011 Filing 367 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DBSO Securities Ltd., Drawbridge Global Macro, Master Fund Ltd-K.(de Leeuw, Michael)
October 28, 2011 Filing 366 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael B. de Leeuw on behalf of DBSO Securities Ltd., Drawbridge Global Macro, Master Fund Ltd-K (de Leeuw, Michael)
October 28, 2011 Filing 365 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by M. Safra & Co., Inc., Tensor Opportunity Limited C. O M..(de Leeuw, Michael)
October 28, 2011 Filing 364 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael B. de Leeuw on behalf of M. Safra & Co., Inc., Tensor Opportunity Limited C. O M. (de Leeuw, Michael)
October 28, 2011 Filing 363 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Houston International Insurance Group, Ltd. for DELOS Insurance Company. Document filed by DELOS Insurance Company.(Yoskowitz, Jack)
October 28, 2011 Filing 362 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jack Yoskowitz on behalf of DELOS Insurance Company (Yoskowitz, Jack)
October 27, 2011 Filing 361 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Angelov on behalf of The Blackstone Group LP (Angelov, Mark)
October 27, 2011 Filing 360 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Matthew Fakler on behalf of The Blackstone Group LP (Fakler, Paul)
October 27, 2011 Filing 359 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Neal Wynn on behalf of The Blackstone Group LP (Wynn, David)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #319 Motion for Allison A Madan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/24/2011) (cd)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER: granting #297 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and granting #76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED and the law firm of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP ("Akin Gump") is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs solely with respect to claims asserted against the defendants that are set forth in this Order. The law firm of Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP is permitted to substitute Akin Gump as counsel for Plaintiffs in this action solely with respect to the claims asserted against the defendants that are set forth in this Order. The law firm of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP is permitted to substitute Akin Gump as counsel for Plaintiffs in this action solely with respect to the claims asserted against the defendants that are set forth in this Order. The law firm of Aronauer, Re & Yudell, LLP is permitted to substitute Akin Gump as counsel for Plaintiffs in this action solely with respect to the claims asserted against the defendants that are set forth in this Order.. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/24/2011) (pl) Modified on 10/26/2011 (pl).
October 25, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Service due by 5/9/2012. (pl)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO SERVE THE SUMMONS AND AMENDED COMPLAINT: granting #246 Motion for Extension of Time. With respect to defendants named in the amended complaint filed on or around August 22, 2011 (a) the time for Plaintiffs to serve the summons and amended complaint in this action (as the amended complaint may be further amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with FRCP 15 and 21) is extended by six months, retroactive to November 9, 2011, and (b) FRCP 4(m) may be satisfied by service of the amended complaint (as it may be further amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with FRCP 15 and 21) on or before May 9, 2012. With respect to defendants who may be added as defendants or changed through amendments on or after August 22, 2011, including defendants within the putative defendant class who Plaintiffs determine should be individually named (a) the time for Plaintiffs to serve the summons and amended complaint in this action (as the amended complaint may be further amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with FRCP 15 and 21) and (b) the time period referenced in FRCP 15(c)(l)(C) shall expire no earlier than May 9, 2012. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/24/2011) (pl) Modified on 10/26/2011 (pl).
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER STAYING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT: granting #271 Motion for Extension of Time. The time to respond to the Amended Complaint in this action or commence motion practice is hereby stayed until further order of this Court for the defendants that are set forth in this Order. Any applicable deadline under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 23 or 26 (or their local counterparts) will also be held in abeyance during the pendency of the Stay.At such time as the Stay is lifted or terminates, this Court shall set the schedule for answering or otherwise responding to the Amended Complaint, unless the action has been transferred to another court for coordinated pretrial proceedings. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/24/2011) (pl) Modified on 10/25/2011 (pl).
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER: granting #243 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #243 Motion to Seal Document. Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT is the operative pleading as to all defendants in the above-captioned case and is deemed filed as of the date of the Motion. Plaintiffs are hereby permitted to file under seal in future filings, including in Exhibit A to the Second Amended Complaint, information regarding payments made to defendants in connection with Tribune Company's 2007 leveraged buyout, or information that could establish a link between a party who produced information to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company and a defendant, and to serve individual defendants with redacted versions of such filings that disclose information relating only to the specific defendants served. This order is without prejudice to any party who, once served, seeks to unseal the information subject hereto. Any party may move this Court at any time to vacate or otherwise modify paragraph (ii) of this Order upon notice to Plaintiffs and all other defendants in this action. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/24/2011) (pl) Modified on 10/25/2011 (pl).
October 25, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney James Chou Document #353 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Richard J. Holwell for approval. (dt)
October 24, 2011 Filing 353 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Anchin Block & Anchin. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Chou, James) Modified on 10/25/2011 (dt).
October 20, 2011 Filing 352 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings Inc. for Instinet Corp NY. Document filed by Instinet Corp NY.(Vandenberg, Raymond)
October 20, 2011 Filing 351 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings America, Inc. for Instinet Corp NY. Document filed by Instinet Corp NY.(Vandenberg, Raymond)
October 20, 2011 Filing 350 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raymond Leonard Vandenberg on behalf of Instinet Corp NY (Vandenberg, Raymond)
October 20, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #319 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 10/14/2011, Receipt Number 1019140. (jd)
October 19, 2011 Filing 349 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Deommissioning Trust, R.E. Ginna Qualified Decommissioning Trust (Mordkoff, David)
October 19, 2011 Filing 348 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Frischer on behalf of R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Deommissioning Trust, R.E. Ginna Qualified Decommissioning Trust (Frischer, Harry)
October 19, 2011 Filing 347 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Deommissioning Trust, R.E. Ginna Qualified Decommissioning Trust (Ratner, Stephen)
October 19, 2011 Filing 346 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of Iolaire Investors LLP, New Eagle Holdings LLC Risk Arbitrage (Mordkoff, David)
October 19, 2011 Filing 345 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Frischer on behalf of Iolaire Investors LLP, New Eagle Holdings LLC Risk Arbitrage (Frischer, Harry)
October 19, 2011 Filing 344 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of Iolaire Investors LLP, New Eagle Holdings LLC Risk Arbitrage (Ratner, Stephen)
October 19, 2011 Filing 343 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. (Mandel, Barry)
October 19, 2011 Filing 342 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Mandel, Barry)
October 19, 2011 Filing 341 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Christopher Greene, Jr on behalf of Lighthouse Partners LLC/ LMA SPC OBO MAP I Segrgtn Prtf C/O Lighthouse Partners LLC (Greene, Stephen)
October 19, 2011 Filing 340 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lighthouse Partners LLC/ LMA SPC OBO MAP I Segrgtn Prtf C/O Lighthouse Partners LLC.(Nathan, David)
October 19, 2011 Filing 339 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Nathan on behalf of Lighthouse Partners LLC/ LMA SPC OBO MAP I Segrgtn Prtf C/O Lighthouse Partners LLC (Nathan, David)
October 19, 2011 Filing 338 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James Rocco Serritella on behalf of Natixis Bleichroeder LLC. New Address: Davis & Gilbert LLP, 1740 Broadway, 21st Floor, New York, New York, USA 10019, 212-468-4800. (Serritella, James)
October 19, 2011 Filing 337 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Cioffi on behalf of Natixis Bleichroeder LLC (Cioffi, Joseph)
October 19, 2011 Filing 336 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Army Nonappropriated Post Retirement Medical and Dental Plan, Corporate Parent Bank of Canada, Corporate Parent Presbyterian Healthcare Services for Madison Square Investors Large-Cap Enhanced Index Fund LP (f/k/a NYLIM-QS Large Cap Enhanced Fund LP). Document filed by Madison Square Investors Large-Cap Enhanced Index Fund LP (f/k/a NYLIM-QS Large Cap Enhanced Fund LP).(Elliott, Mark)
October 19, 2011 Filing 335 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Michael Elliott on behalf of Madison Square Investors Large-Cap Enhanced Index Fund LP (f/k/a NYLIM-QS Large Cap Enhanced Fund LP) (Elliott, Mark)
October 19, 2011 Filing 334 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Natixis, S.A. for Natixis Bleichroeder LLC. Document filed by Natixis Bleichroeder LLC.(Serritella, James)
October 19, 2011 Filing 333 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Rocco Serritella on behalf of Natixis Bleichroeder LLC (Serritella, James)
October 19, 2011 Filing 332 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Index Trust, Inc. for T.Rowe Price Equity Index 500 Fund, T.Rowe Price Total Equity Market Index Fund. Document filed by T.Rowe Price Equity Index 500 Fund, T.Rowe Price Total Equity Market Index Fund.(Elliott, Mark)
October 19, 2011 Filing 331 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Michael Elliott on behalf of T.Rowe Price Equity Index 500 Fund, T.Rowe Price Total Equity Market Index Fund (Elliott, Mark)
October 19, 2011 Filing 330 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard S. Miller on behalf of Blue Chip Fund, a series of First Investors Life Series Funds, Value Fund, a series of First Investors Equity Funds, Value Fund, a series of First Investors Life Series Funds (Miller, Richard)
October 19, 2011 Filing 329 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent First Investors Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The Independent Order of Foresters, Other Affiliate The Independent Order of Foresters for Value Fund, a series of First Investors Life Series Funds. Document filed by Value Fund, a series of First Investors Life Series Funds.(Miller, Richard)
October 19, 2011 Filing 328 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Value Fund, a series of First Investors Equity Funds.(Miller, Richard)
October 19, 2011 Filing 327 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent First Investors Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The Independent Order of Foresters, Other Affiliate The Independent Order of Foresters for Blue Chip Fund, a series of First Investors Life Series Funds. Document filed by Blue Chip Fund, a series of First Investors Life Series Funds.(Miller, Richard)
October 19, 2011 Filing 326 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Empire State Carpenters Pension.(Madan, Allison)
October 19, 2011 Filing 325 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison A. Madan on behalf of Empire State Carpenters Pension (Madan, Allison)
October 18, 2011 Filing 324 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. MLPF & S Cust FPO served on 10/5/2011, answer due 10/26/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 18, 2011 Filing 323 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Royal Bank of Canada served on 10/3/2011, answer due 10/24/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 18, 2011 Filing 322 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Caxton Associates LP served on 10/3/2011, answer due 10/24/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 18, 2011 Filing 321 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L served on 10/3/2011, answer due 10/24/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 18, 2011 Filing 320 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 17, 2011 Filing 318 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GMIMCO Trust.(Steinberg, Arthur)
October 17, 2011 Filing 317 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur Jay Steinberg on behalf of GMIMCO Trust (Steinberg, Arthur)
October 14, 2011 Filing 319 MOTION for Allison A. Madan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Empire State Carpenters Pension.(bcu)
October 14, 2011 Filing 315 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent R. Cappucci on behalf of Mid Atlantic Capital Corp. (Cappucci, Vincent)
October 14, 2011 Filing 314 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent R. Cappucci on behalf of CBS Master Trust, Fordham University, Mario J. Gabelli, Gabelli & Company Inc., Gabelli Equity Trust, Inc., Gabelli Foundation, Inc., Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Gabelli Funds Inc.) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Gabelli) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Th Gabelli Equity INC FD) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (The Gabelli Asset Fund) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (The Gabelli Global Multimed TR) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc.(Gabelli ABC Fund), Gabelli Funds, LLC, Gabelli Global Deal Fund, Gabelli Securities, Inc., Gabelli Value Fund, Inc., Gamco Asset Management Inc., Gamco Investors Inc., Gaqbelli AVG Price 2, Mario J. Gabelli Gamco Investors Inc. (Cappucci, Vincent)
October 14, 2011 Filing 313 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olga Minkina on behalf of New York City Deferred Compensation Plan (Minkina, Olga)
October 13, 2011 Filing 312 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Securities Inc. served on 10/10/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 13, 2011 Filing 311 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. T/W W Milton Jr FBO Anna Livingstone served on 10/6/2011, answer due 10/27/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 13, 2011 Filing 310 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cara Leigh Gilespie-Wilson served on 10/4/2011, answer due 10/25/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 13, 2011 Filing 309 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Alson Capital Partners, LLC served on 10/5/2011, answer due 10/26/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 13, 2011 Filing 308 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cogent Management Inc. served on 10/5/2011, answer due 10/26/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 13, 2011 Filing 307 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Gryphon Hidden Values VIII LTD served on 10/5/2011, answer due 10/26/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 13, 2011 Filing 306 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 12, 2011 Filing 305 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Paul Richman on behalf of Schultze Asset Management, LLC. New Address: Patton Boggs LLP, 1185 Avenue of the Americas, 30th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10036, (646) 557-5100. (Richman, Michael)
October 6, 2011 Filing 304 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Melanie Anita Grossman on behalf of LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC. New Address: Cohen & Gresser LLP, 800 Third Avenue, 21st Floor, New York, NY, USA 10022, (212) 957-7600. (Grossman, Melanie)
October 5, 2011 Filing 303 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami re: Mailing of Service Documents on September 30, 2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Korpus, Sheron)
October 5, 2011 Filing 302 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami re: Mailing of Service Documents on September 26, 2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2)(Korpus, Sheron)
October 5, 2011 Filing 301 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Firstar Trust Company served on 9/30/2011, answer due 10/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 5, 2011 Filing 300 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lincoln FD Tax Advantage served on 9/27/2011, answer due 10/18/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER STAYING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT granting #140 Motion to Stay; granting #153 Motion to Stay, as further set forth in this document. At such time as the Stay is lifted or terminates, this Court shall set the schedule for answering or otherwise responding to the Amended Complaint, unless the action has been transferred to another court for coordinated pretrial proceedings. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/4/2011) (cd)
October 4, 2011 Filing 298 DECLARATION of Daniel H. Golden in Support re: #297 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Amended Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 297 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Amended Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 296 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Value Line Asset Management served on 9/28/2011, answer due 10/19/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 295 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Value Line Income Fund served on 9/28/2011, answer due 10/19/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 294 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Value Line Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Joseph D'Auria on behalf of Lenox Hill Hospital (D'Auria, Anthony)
October 4, 2011 Filing 292 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Societe General Asset Management served on 9/21/2011, answer due 10/12/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 291 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Nicholas G. Chantiles served on 9/27/2011, answer due 10/18/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 290 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Commerzbank AG served on 9/23/2011, answer due 10/14/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 289 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. GMIMCO Trust (General Motors) Bruce Marquand served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 288 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Securities Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 287 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. GSS LLC served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 286 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fairweather LTD PTRSHP R1F3154C Custodian served on 9/28/2011, answer due 10/19/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 285 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fairweather Family L.P. served on 9/28/2011, answer due 10/19/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 284 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lori Banner Kupferberg served on 9/28/2011, answer due 10/19/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
October 4, 2011 Filing 283 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy E. Millard on behalf of Capitalia Azionario USA C/O Capitalia AM SGR SPA C/O Unicredit S.P.A. (Millard, Amy)
October 4, 2011 Filing 282 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Scott Hugel on behalf of Capitalia Azionario USA C/O Capitalia AM SGR SPA C/O Unicredit S.P.A. (Hugel, Paul)
October 3, 2011 Filing 281 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Davis on behalf of Bakery CONF TOB WRKS Local 102 (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Davis, Stephen)
October 3, 2011 Filing 280 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami Re: Mailing of Service Documents on September 30, 2011 re: #276 AMENDED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Amended Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2011 Filing 279 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami re: #277 Declaration in Support of Motion, #276 AMENDED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Amended Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel. Declaration of Stephen J. Cirami re: Mailing of Service Documents on September 30, 2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 30, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney David M. Zensky to RE-FILE Document #277 Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document linked to filing error. (ldi)
September 30, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney David M. Zensky to RE-FILE Document #276 AMENDED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Amended Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel. ERROR(S): Wrong case number indicated on document. (ldi)
September 30, 2011 Filing 278 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami re: Mailing of Service Documents re: #271 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint on Certain Defendants.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2011 Filing 277 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Daniel H. Golden in Support re: #276 AMENDED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Amended Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David) Modified on 10/3/2011 (ldi).
September 30, 2011 Filing 276 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Amended Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zensky, David) Modified on 10/3/2011 (ldi).
September 30, 2011 Filing 275 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Empire State Carpenters Pension served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Zensky, David)
September 30, 2011 Filing 274 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. ASB Advisors LLC served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 30, 2011 Filing 273 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. LYRA Capital LLC served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 30, 2011 Filing 272 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 29, 2011 Filing 271 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint on Certain Defendants. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company.(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #155 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $800.00, paid on 09/14/2011, Receipt Number 1016494,1016496,1016497,1016498. (jd)
September 28, 2011 Filing 269 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami re: #246 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint., #247 Declaration in Support of Motion, #244 Declaration in Support of Motion, #245 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #248 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #243 MOTION for Leave to File The Second Amended Complaint. MOTION to Seal Document. Re: Service of Documents. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 28, 2011 Filing 268 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint and supporting papers and Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint and supporting papers on 9/26/11. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2011 Filing 267 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Societe Generale, SA, Corporate Parent Newedge Group SA, Corporate Parent Credit Agricole Corporate Investment Bank, SA for Newedge USA, LLC, Equity Clearing Division. Document filed by Newedge USA, LLC, Equity Clearing Division.(Ratner, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 Filing 266 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jefferies Group, Inc. for Jefferies & Company, Inc.. Document filed by Jefferies & Company, Inc..(Ratner, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 Filing 265 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lloyd M. Eisenberg on behalf of Rosemary Wagner (Eisenberg, Lloyd)
September 27, 2011 Filing 264 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pension Trust Fund Local Union#27.(Ratner, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 Filing 263 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Equity League Pension Trust Fund.(Ratner, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 Filing 262 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Evergreen Asset Management C/O Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc.. Document filed by Evergreen Asset Management C/O Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc..(Ratner, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 Filing 261 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Strategic Funds, Inc..(Ratner, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 Filing 260 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dreyfus/Laurel Funds Inc.(Ratner, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 Filing 259 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. for Dreyfus Index Funds, Inc.. Document filed by Dreyfus Index Funds, Inc..(Ratner, Stephen)
September 27, 2011 Filing 258 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation.(Mashberg, Gregg)
September 27, 2011 Filing 257 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Depository Trust Company.(Mashberg, Gregg)
September 27, 2011 Filing 256 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CEDE & Co C/O Depository Trust Company.(Mashberg, Gregg)
September 27, 2011 Filing 255 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregg M Mashberg on behalf of CEDE & Co C/O Depository Trust Company, Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Depository Trust Company (Mashberg, Gregg)
September 27, 2011 Filing 254 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Shane Elbaum on behalf of CEDE & Co C/O Depository Trust Company, Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Depository Trust Company (Elbaum, Lawrence) Modified on 10/4/2011 (kco).
September 27, 2011 Filing 253 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Shane Elbaum on behalf of CEDE & Co C/O Depository Trust Company, Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Depository Trust Company (Elbaum, Lawrence) Modified on 10/4/2011 (kco).
September 27, 2011 Filing 252 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Shane Elbaum on behalf of CEDE & Co C/O Depository Trust Company, Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Depository Trust Company (Elbaum, Lawrence)
September 27, 2011 Filing 251 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of B Trade Services LLC, Dreyfus Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus Stock Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus/Laurel Funds Inc, Equity League Pension Trust Fund, Evergreen Asset Management C/O Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., Jefferies & Company, Inc., Newedge USA, LLC, Equity Clearing Division, Pension Trust Fund Local Union#27, Strategic Funds, Inc. (Mordkoff, David)
September 27, 2011 Filing 250 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Frischer on behalf of B Trade Services LLC, Dreyfus Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus Stock Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus/Laurel Funds Inc, Equity League Pension Trust Fund, Evergreen Asset Management C/O Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., Jefferies & Company, Inc., Newedge USA, LLC, Equity Clearing Division, Pension Trust Fund Local Union#27, Strategic Funds, Inc. (Frischer, Harry)
September 27, 2011 Filing 249 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of B Trade Services LLC, Dreyfus Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus Stock Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus/Laurel Funds Inc, Equity League Pension Trust Fund, Evergreen Asset Management C/O Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., Jefferies & Company, Inc., Newedge USA, LLC, Equity Clearing Division, Pension Trust Fund Local Union#27, Strategic Funds, Inc. (Ratner, Stephen)
September 26, 2011 Filing 248 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #246 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 247 DECLARATION of David M. Zensky in Support re: #246 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 246 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Summons and Complaint. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 245 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #243 MOTION for Leave to File The Second Amended Complaint. MOTION to Seal Document.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 244 DECLARATION of David M. Zensky in Support re: #243 MOTION for Leave to File The Second Amended Complaint. MOTION to Seal Document.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 243 MOTION for Leave to File The Second Amended Complaint ., MOTION to Seal Document . Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 242 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fierstein Company served on 9/16/2011, answer due 10/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 241 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Emerald Pooled U.S. Fund served on 9/22/2011, answer due 10/13/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 240 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity served on 9/22/2011, answer due 10/13/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 239 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Emerald U.S. Market Index Fund served on 9/22/2011, answer due 10/13/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 238 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD U.S. Large Cap Value Fund served on 9/22/2011, answer due 10/13/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 237 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD U.S. Index Fund served on 9/22/2011, answer due 10/13/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 236 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tocqueville Asset Management L.P. served on 9/22/2011, answer due 10/13/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 235 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New Eagle Holdings LLC Risk Arbitrage served on 9/22/2011, answer due 10/13/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 234 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jonathan A. Knee served on 9/15/2011, answer due 10/6/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 233 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. TR UA 11/20/02 Himan Brown Revocable Trust waiver sent on 8/22/2011, answer due 10/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 232 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ciri Gillispie waiver sent on 8/22/2011, answer due 10/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 231 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Fierstein Company waiver sent on 8/22/2011, answer due 10/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 230 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Margaret T.M. Jones CP & CO AC waiver sent on 8/22/2011, answer due 10/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 229 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Newedge USA, LLC, Equity Clearing Division waiver sent on 8/22/2011, answer due 10/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 228 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. T.Rowe Price Equity Index 500 Fund waiver sent on 8/22/2011, answer due 10/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 227 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. T.Rowe Price Total Equity Market Index Fund waiver sent on 8/22/2011, answer due 10/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 226 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New Eagle Holdings LLC Risk Arbitrage served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 225 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Iolaire Investors LLP C/O ASB Advisors LLC served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 224 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Institutional Benchmarks Series (Master Feeder) Limited C/O LYRA Capital LLC served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 223 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dr. David L. Hoexter IRA R/O served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 222 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Local 102 Pension/NO TR VAL IM served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 221 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. BMO Nesbit Burns Inc./CDS served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 220 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lenox Hill Hospital served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 219 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Abigail Wallach served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 218 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Joan E. Clark served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 217 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mid Atlantic Capital Corp. served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 216 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jerome & Maria Markowitz JTWROS served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 215 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 214 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Portfolio 1 Offshore Master LP LSV C/O GS & CO served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 213 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Flexible US Equity Managers served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 212 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Newedge USA, LLC, Equity Clearing Division served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 211 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. GS&CO served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 210 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Merger Fund served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 209 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Peter Fairweather served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 208 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 207 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tensor Opportunity Limited C. O M. served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 206 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. M. Safra & Co., Inc. served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 205 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Instinet Corp NY served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 204 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Asset Management USA Inc. served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 203 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Capitalia AM SGR SPA served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Capitalia AM SGR SPA; Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 202 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Capitalia Azionario USA C/O Capitalia AM SGR SPA C/O Unicredit S.P.A. served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 201 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. UniCredit S.p.A. served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; UniCredit S.p.A.; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 200 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. MACM 8 served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 199 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mutual Of Amer Life Ins COA/C Equity-Index Fund served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 198 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Systeia Capital Management C/O served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 197 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amundi Investment Advisors USA, Inc. served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 196 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc. served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 195 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. CBS Master Trust served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 194 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Archdiocese Of New York Master Trust served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 193 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fordham University served on 9/8/2011, answer due 9/29/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 192 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Deommissioning Trust served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 191 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. R.E. Ginna Qualified Decommissioning Trust served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 190 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. IBEW Local 25 Master Trust Plan served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 23, 2011 Filing 189 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Rosemary Wagner served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Rosemary Wagner; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 22, 2011 Filing 188 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Legg Mason Partners served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 22, 2011 Filing 187 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY -(SEE DOCUMENT #272) - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert A. Simins Jtwors served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David) Modified on 10/4/2011 (lb).
September 22, 2011 Filing 186 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jamie A. Simins Jtwros served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 22, 2011 Filing 185 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. L3 Communication Corporation Master Trust served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 22, 2011 Filing 184 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. NYLIM-QS Large Cap Enhanced Fund LP served on 9/12/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 22, 2011 Filing 183 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc. served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 22, 2011 Filing 182 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD U.S. Large Cap Value Fund C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc. served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 22, 2011 Filing 181 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD U.S. Index Fund C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc. served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 22, 2011 Filing 180 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Emerald Pooled U.S. Fund C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc. served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 22, 2011 Filing 179 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. TD Emerald U.S. Market Index Fund C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc. served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Martha P. Pope answer to complaint due 11/20/2011; Martha Pope answer to complaint due 11/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/21/2011) (cd)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendant Millenco LLC shall have up to and including 11/20/2011, to respond to the complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. Millenco LLC answer due 11/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/21/2011) (tro)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION AND ORDER: US Trust Co. N.A. answer to complaint due 11/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/21/2011) (cd)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendant(s) Havens Partners Enhanced Fund, L.P. and Havens Partners, L.P. shall have up to and including 11/21/2011, to answer, move or otherwise respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. Havens Partners Enhanced Fund, L.P. answer due 11/21/2011; Havens Partners, L.P. answer due 11/21/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/20/2011) (tro)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER: White Mountains RE Bermuda Ltd C/O White Mountains Reinsurance Company of America answer tot he Amended Complaint due 11/14/2011; White Mountains Reinsurance Company Of America answer tot he Amended Complaint due 11/14/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/20/2011) (cd)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants Governing Council of the University of Toronto and the University of Toronto Master Trust (identified in the Complaint and the Amended Complaint as University of Toronto and U of T Master Trust, respectively) shall have to and including 11/14/2011 to answer, move or otherwise plead with respect to the Amended Complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. C.O U of T Master Trust C.O the Blackstone Group LP answer due 11/14/2011; University of Toronto C/O the Blackstone Group LP answer due 11/14/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/20/2011) (tro)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Fortis Clearing Americas LLC 695 answer to amended complaint due 11/21/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/21/2011) (cd)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants Cougar Trading, LLC, Emanuel E. Geduld 2005 Family Trust, and Swiss Re Financial Products Corp., shall have up to and including 11/21/2011, to respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of the proceedings which may then be in effect. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/20/2011) (tro)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendant Ruth Gruenthal shall have up to and including 11/20/2011, to respond to the amended complaint, subject to any of proceedings which may then be in effect. Ruth Gruenthal answer due 11/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/20/2011) (tro)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Investment Tech Group Inc. answer to complaint due 11/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/21/2011) (cd)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants Government Of Singapore Investment Corp PTE and Monetary Authority/Singapore shall have up to and including 11/21/2011 to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. Government Of Singapore Investment Corp PTE LTD answer due 11/21/2011; Monetary Authority/ Singapore answer due 11/21/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/20/2011) (tro)
September 21, 2011 Filing 167 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Citadel Equity Fund LTD/Leeds MGMT SVCS (Cayman) Ltd C/O Citadel Investment Group LLC waiver sent on 8/22/2011, answer due 10/21/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2011 Filing 166 STIPULATION: Defendant Pacific Select Funds shall have up to and including 10/20/2011 to respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/14/2011) (ab)
September 21, 2011 Filing 165 STIPULATION: Defendant Anchin Block & Anchin LLP shall have up to and including 10/20/2011 to respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/14/2011) (ab)
September 21, 2011 Filing 164 STIPULATION: Defendant Robert E La Blanc shall have up to and including 10/20/2011 to respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/19/2011) (ab)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #155 Motion for Daniel D. Rubinstein, Kevin D. Finger, Bevin M. Brennan and Jonathan H. Claydon to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Citadel Equity Fund LTD / Leeds Mgmt Svcs (Cayman) Ltd. c/o Citadel Investment Group LLC. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/19/2011) (ab)
September 21, 2011 Filing 162 STIPULATION: Defendant Consolidated Edison Of NY K801 shall have up to and including 10/20/2011 to respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/19/2011) (ab)
September 21, 2011 Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John H. Byington, III on behalf of IBEW Local 25 Master Trust Plan (Byington, John)
September 20, 2011 Filing 160 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Rudolph Lurie on behalf of Robert E La Blanc (Lurie, David)
September 19, 2011 Filing 159 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance on 9/16/11. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Cougar Trading, LLC, Emanuel E. Geduld 2005 Family Trust. (Momborquette, David)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER STAYING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT: Upon consideration of plaintiffs' motion #110 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion isGRANTED as to all defendants except the following: Blackport Capital Fund Ltd; Citadel Equity Fund Ltd/Leeds Mgmt Svcs(Cayman) Ltd c/o Citadel Investment Group LLC; FolksAmerica ReinsuranceCompany; LaBranche & Co. LLC; LaBranche Structured Products LLC;Neuberger Berman Inc.; Nomura Securities International, Inc.; NomuraSecurities International Inc.-Stock Lending; Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP c/oABP Investments US, Inc.; Stichting Pensioenfonds Hoogovens; StichtingPensioenfonds Oce c/o ABP Investments US, Inc.; Stichting Pensioenfonds Van dec/o ABP Investments US, Inc.; Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg c/o ABP InvestmentsUs, Inc.; U ofT l~aster Trust; University of Toronto; White Mountains ReBermuda Ltd; and White Mountains Reinsurance Company of America. For all defendants other than those listed above, the time to respond to the Amended Complaint in this action or commence motion practice is hereby stayed until further order of this Court. Any applicable deadline under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 23 or 26 (or their local counterparts) will also be held in abeyance during the pendency of the Stay. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/19/2011) (rdz)
September 16, 2011 Filing 157 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Stichting Pensionenfonds ABP C/O ABP Investments US, Inc. served on 9/7/2011, answer due 9/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2011 Filing 156 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Citadel Equity Fund LTD/Leeds MGMT SVCS (Cayman) Ltd C/O Citadel Investment Group LLC served on 9/7/2011, answer due 9/28/2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2011 Filing 154 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Ethan Enloe on behalf of New York Estate Teacher's Retirement System (Enloe, Charles)
September 15, 2011 Filing 153 MOTION to Stay re: #112 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #111 Declaration in Support of Motion / Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Certain Defendants' Time to Respond. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Burgo, Paul)
September 15, 2011 Filing 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul J. Burgo on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas (Burgo, Paul)
September 15, 2011 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine A. Montenegro on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas (Montenegro, Christine)
September 15, 2011 Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheron Korpus on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas (Korpus, Sheron)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Nomura Securities International Inc.-Stock Lending and Nomura Securities International, Inc. shall have up to and including 10/20/2011, to respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. Nomura Securities International Inc.-Stock Lending answer due 10/20/2011; Nomura Securities International, Inc. answer due 10/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/13/2011) (tro) Modified on 9/16/2011 (tro).
September 15, 2011 Filing 148 STIPULATION: Defendant Lighthouse Partners, LLC shall have up to and including 10/20/2011, to respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. Lighthouse Partners, LLC /I Segrgtn Prtf C/O Lighthouse Partners LLC answer due 10/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/13/2011) (tro)
September 14, 2011 Filing 155 MOTION for Daniel D. Rubinstein, Kevin D. Finger, Bevin M. Brennan, & Jonathan H. Claydon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Citadel Equity Fund LTD/Leeds MGMT SVCS (Cayman) Ltd C/O Citadel Investment Group LLC.(pgu)
September 13, 2011 Filing 147 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Citadel Equity Fund LTD/Leeds MGMT SVCS (Cayman) Ltd C/O Citadel Investment Group LLC.(Sims, Rachel)
September 13, 2011 Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Sims on behalf of Citadel Equity Fund LTD/Leeds MGMT SVCS (Cayman) Ltd C/O Citadel Investment Group LLC (Sims, Rachel)
September 12, 2011 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami re: Mailing of Service Documents on September 12, 2011. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2011 Filing 144 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Matthew Fakler on behalf of Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd. (Fakler, Paul)
September 12, 2011 Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Neal Wynn on behalf of Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd. (Wynn, David)
September 12, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Angelov on behalf of Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd. (Angelov, Mark)
September 12, 2011 Filing 141 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Stuart Mack, New Attorney: David Wynn, Address: Arent Fox, 1675 Broadway, 31st Floor, New York, NY, United States 10019, 212-484-3900. Document filed by Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd.. (Angelov, Mark)
September 12, 2011 Filing 140 MOTION to Stay Certain Defendants' Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint in this Action or Commence Motion Practice Until Further Order of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, or Further Order of this Court. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2011 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of Brett D. Jaffe; Notice of Appearance of Melanie A. Grossman; and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. served on David Kosner of Kasowitz Benson Torres & Friedman L.L.P. on 9/9/2011. Service was made by FedEx overnight. Document filed by LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC. (Grossman, Melanie)
September 8, 2011 Filing 138 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cowen Group, Inc. for LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC. Document filed by LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC.(Jaffe, Brett)
September 8, 2011 Filing 137 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melanie Anita Grossman on behalf of LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC (Grossman, Melanie)
September 8, 2011 Filing 136 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett D. Jaffe on behalf of LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC (Jaffe, Brett)
September 8, 2011 Filing 135 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., Strategic Opportunity BMO Nesbitt Burns C/O Adaly Investment Management Co..(Honecker, Rodman)
September 8, 2011 Filing 134 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rodman E. Honecker on behalf of Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., Strategic Opportunity BMO Nesbitt Burns C/O Adaly Investment Management Co. (Honecker, Rodman)
September 8, 2011 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard F Levy on behalf of Elizabeth H. Vanmerkensteijn (Levy, Richard)
September 8, 2011 Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joel Lack on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (Lack, Robert)
September 8, 2011 Filing 131 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Mitsui Trust Holdings, Inc. for Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd. Trustee, The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd.. Document filed by Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd. Trustee, The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd..(Stern, Jordan)
September 8, 2011 Filing 130 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan E. Stern on behalf of Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd. Trustee, The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd. (Stern, Jordan)
September 8, 2011 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan E. Stern on behalf of Pension Fund Association for Local Government Officials (Stern, Jordan)
September 8, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan E. Stern on behalf of Secretaria to Mutual Benefit Association for Tokyo Metropolitan Employees (Stern, Jordan)
September 8, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Sangyun Kim on behalf of Monetary Authority/ Singapore (Kim, Michael)
September 8, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Lauren Rose on behalf of Monetary Authority/ Singapore (Rose, Danielle)
September 8, 2011 Filing 125 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Kurtis McCulloch on behalf of Monetary Authority/ Singapore (McCulloch, Scott)
September 7, 2011 Filing 124 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2011 Filing 123 STIPULATION: Defendants Cougar Trading LLC and Emanuel E. Geduld 2005 Family Trust shall have up to and including September 20,2011, to respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. (Cougar Trading, LLC answer due 9/20/2011; Emanuel E. Geduld 2005 Family Trust answer due 9/20/2011.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/6/2011) (jar)
September 7, 2011 Filing 122 STIPULATION: Defendant Margaret T.M. Jones CP & Co. AC shall have up to and including September 20, 20 II, to answer or move with respect to the complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect (Margaret T.M. Jones CP & CO AC answer due 9/20/2011.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/6/2011) (jar)
September 7, 2011 Filing 121 STIPULATION: Defendants RIEF RMP LLC c/o Renaissance Technologies LLC and RIEF Trading LLC c/o Renaissance Technologies LLC shall have up to and including September 20,2011, to answer or move with respect to the complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. (RIEF RMP LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC answer due 9/20/2011; RIEF Trading LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC answer due 9/20/2011.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/8/2011) (jar)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER: New York City Deferred Compensation Plan shall have up to and including 10/20/2011, to respond to the amended complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. New York City Deferred Compensation Plan answer due 10/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/6/2011) (tro)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 9/20/2011, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. Jefferies & Company, Inc. answer due 9/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/6/2011) (tro)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Ciri Gillispie shall have up to and including 9/20/2011, to respond to the complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. Ciri Gillispie answer due 9/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/6/2011) (tro)
September 7, 2011 Filing 117 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd..(Mack, Stuart)
September 7, 2011 Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (pgu)
September 7, 2011 Filing 116 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Holwell. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
September 7, 2011 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-cv-04522-RJH. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu)
September 6, 2011 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Parker on behalf of Havens Partners Enhanced Fund, L.P., Havens Partners, L.P. (Parker, David)
September 6, 2011 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbey Walsh on behalf of Havens Partners Enhanced Fund, L.P., Havens Partners, L.P. (Walsh, Abbey)
September 2, 2011 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami re: #112 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #110 MOTION to Stay., #111 Declaration in Support of Motion Declaration of Stephen J. Cirami as to Mailing of Service Documents on 9/2/11. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 2, 2011 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #110 MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 2, 2011 Filing 111 DECLARATION of David M. Zensky in Support re: #110 MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Zensky, David)
September 2, 2011 Filing 110 MOTION to Stay. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zensky, David)
September 2, 2011 Filing 109 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #107 MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Young, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/8/2011 (db).
September 2, 2011 Filing 108 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of David M. Zensky in Support re: #107 MOTION to Stay.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Young, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/8/2011 (db).
September 2, 2011 Filing 107 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Stay. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/8/2011 (db).
September 1, 2011 Filing 105 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NYC District Council Carpenters Pension, NYC District Council Carpenters Welfare.(Frank, Erica)
September 1, 2011 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erica Eden Frank on behalf of NYC District Council Carpenters Pension, NYC District Council Carpenters Welfare (Frank, Erica)
September 1, 2011 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jack Yoskowitz on behalf of Folksamerica Reinsurance Company, Homeland and Insurance Company Of New York C/O One Beacon Insurance Co., White Mountains RE Bermuda Ltd C/O White Mountains Reinsurance Company of America, White Mountains Reinsurance Company Of America (Yoskowitz, Jack)
September 1, 2011 Filing 102 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying White Mountains Holding Company, Inc. for White Mountains Reinsurance Company of America; and Folksamerica Reinsurance Company. Sirius International Insurance Corporation for White Mountains RE Bermuda Ltd. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Folksamerica Reinsurance Company, White Mountains RE Bermuda Ltd C/O White Mountains Reinsurance Company of America, White Mountains Reinsurance Company Of America.(Yoskowitz, Jack)
September 1, 2011 Filing 101 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying OneBeacon Insurance Company as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Homeland and Insurance Company Of New York C/O One Beacon Insurance Co..(Yoskowitz, Jack)
August 30, 2011 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. Leon on behalf of Thomas J. Majorana (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Leon, Michael)
August 30, 2011 Filing 99 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Bank of America Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by US Trust Co. N.A..(Cantor, Daniel)
August 30, 2011 Filing 98 JOINDER to join re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by US Trust Co. N.A..(Cantor, Daniel)
August 26, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Claire Spivack on behalf of U of T Master Trust C.O the Blackstone Group LP, University of Toronto C/O the Blackstone Group LP (Spivack, Julia)
August 26, 2011 Filing 96 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by U of T Master Trust C.O the Blackstone Group LP, University of Toronto C/O the Blackstone Group LP.(McNamara, Michael)
August 26, 2011 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James McNamara on behalf of U of T Master Trust C.O the Blackstone Group LP, University of Toronto C/O the Blackstone Group LP (McNamara, Michael)
August 25, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Claire Spivack on behalf of Folksamerica Reinsurance Company, White Mountains RE Bermuda Ltd C/O White Mountains Reinsurance Company of America, White Mountains Reinsurance Company Of America (Spivack, Julia)
August 25, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Claire Spivack on behalf of Homeland and Insurance Company Of New York C/O One Beacon Insurance Co. (Spivack, Julia)
August 25, 2011 Filing 92 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying A.R.T. Holdings International (BVI) Ltd. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by GDK INC C/O Caxton Associates LP.(Kane, Rachel)
August 24, 2011 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Francis Markert on behalf of Martha P. Pope, Martha Pope (Markert, Richard)
August 24, 2011 Filing 90 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Motion before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for Transfer Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' MDL Motion and Supporting Documents)(Chou, James)
August 24, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Steven Shamah on behalf of US Trust Co. N.A. (Shamah, Daniel)
August 24, 2011 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Lucas Cantor on behalf of US Trust Co. N.A. (Cantor, Daniel)
August 24, 2011 Filing 87 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hypo Real Estate Holding AG as Corporate Parent. Document filed by DEPFA Bank PLC (HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L).(Kane, Rachel)
August 23, 2011 Filing 86 STIPULATION: Defendants Investment Technology Group, Inc. and ITG Inc. shall have up to and including September 20, 2011, to answer or move with respect to the complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. ITG Inc. answer due 9/20/2011; Investment Tech Group Inc. answer due 9/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/19/2011) (tro)
August 23, 2011 Filing 85 STIPULATION: Defendants (i) Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd. (both for itself and in its capacity as trustee for the Pension Commingle Fund), (ii) Secretaria to Mutual Benefit Association for Tokyo Metropolitan Employees, and (iii) Pension Fund Association for Local Government Officials (collectively, "Defendants") shall have up to and including September 20, 2011, to respond to the complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. Pension Commingle Fund, SWAPS, SBI answer due 9/20/2011; Pension Fund Association for Local Government Officials answer due 9/20/2011; Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd. Trustee answer due 9/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/19/2011) (tro)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION: The deadline for Defendants Amalgamated Bank; Bessemer Trust Company; BMO Nesbitt Bums Trading Corp. SA, Brown Brothers Harriman and Co., SG Americas Securities, LLC; and Swiss American Securities Inc. to respond to the complaint shall be extended to September 20, 2011, to allow Plaintiffs to file a motion to stay this matter pending further order of the Bankruptcy Court in In re Tribune Co., Case No. 08-13141 (KJC) (Bankr. D. Del.), pursuant to the April 25, 2011, order of the Bankruptcy Court in that case. Amalgamated Bank answer due 9/20/2011; BMO Nesbit Burns Trading Corp. SA answer due 9/20/2011; Bessemer Trust Company answer due 9/20/2011; Brown Brothers Harriman & Co. answer due 9/20/2011; SG Americas Securities, LLC answer due 9/20/2011; Swiss American Securities Inc. answer due 9/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/19/2011) (tro)
August 23, 2011 Filing 83 STIPULATION: Defendant ABN AMRO Clearing Chicago, LLC, formerly known as Fortis Clearing Americas LLC, shall have up to and including 9/20/2011, to respond to the complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. Fortis Clearing Americas LLC 695 answer due 9/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/19/2011) (tro)
August 23, 2011 Filing 82 STIPULATION: Defendants the Governing Council of the University of Toronto and the University of Toronto Master Trust shall have up to and including 9/20/2011, to answer or move or otherwise plead with respect to the complaint, subject to any stay of proceedings which may then be in effect. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/19/2011) (tro)
August 22, 2011 Filing 106 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 11A SPX1, ABP, Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., Alexander Solon Irra FBO Alexander Solon C/O MLPF&S Cust FPO, Alson Cap Partners LLC/ Alson Signature FD Offshore M&C Corporate Services Ltd., Alson Capital Partners, LLC, Amalgamated Bank, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Amundi Investment Advisors USA, Inc., Anchin Block & Anchin, Anima Societa' Di Gestione C/O BPM Capital Trust GSS LLC, Archdiocese Of New York Master Trust, B Trade Services LLC, BMO Nesbit Burns Inc./CDS, BMO Nesbit Burns Trading Corp. SA, Bakery CONF TOB WRKS Local 102, Barry Kupferberg David & Lori Banner Kupferberg JT TEN, Bell Atlantic Master Trust, Bessemer Trust Company, Blackport Capital Fund, Ltd., Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Brown Brothers Harriman and Company/ETF, CBS Master Trust, CEDE & Co C/O Depository Trust Company, CGM IRA Custodian, CIM XVI LLC, Capitalia Azionario USA C/O Capitalia AM SGR SPA C/O Unicredit S.P.A., Cara Leigh Gilespie-Wilson, Nicholas G. Chantiles, Charles Pratt & Company LLC, Citadel Equity Fund LTD/Leeds MGMT SVCS (Cayman) Ltd C/O Citadel Investment Group LLC, Citi Golden Tree Ltd. C/O Golden Tree Asset Management LP, Joan E. Clark, Clearwater Investment, Cogent Management Inc., Commerz Markets LLC, Condor C/O Robeco Inst Asset MGMT BV C/O Robeco Investment Management, Consolidated Edison Of NY K801, Convertibles Strategic Hold, Cougar Trading, LLC, Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., D E Shaw Valence Portfolio LLC, DBSO Securities Ltd., DELOS Insurance Company, DEPFA Bank PLC (HYPO Real Estate Bank INT'L), Delaware Charter G & T TTEE, Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Depository Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Dexia Bank C/O Dexia Credit Local, Dr. David L. Hoexter IRA R/O, Drawbridge Global Macro, Master Fund Ltd-K, Dresdner Bank, AG C/O Commerzbank AG, Dreyfus Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus S&P 500 ST INDX FD, Dreyfus Stock Index Funds, Inc., Dreyfus/Laurel Funds Inc, E*Trade Clearing LLC, E-Connectivity AVG PX, Emanuel E. Geduld 2005 Family Trust, Equity Clearing Division, Equity League Pension Trust Fund, Evergreen Asset Management C/O Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc., Peter Fairweather, Fairweather Family L.P., Fairweather LTD PTRSHP R1F3154C Custodian, Fideuram Bank Luxembourg S.A. C/O Intesa Sanpaolo, Fierstein Company, First Investors Life Series Fund Blue Chip Series, First Investors Life Series Fund Utilities Series, First Investors Utilities Income, Firstar Trust Company, Flexible US Equity Managers, Folksamerica Reinsurance Company, Fordham University, Fortis Clearing Americas LLC 695, GDK INC C/O Caxton Associates LP, GMIMCO Trust (General Motors) Bruce Marquand, Gabelli Funds, LLC, Gabelli Global Deal Fund, Gabelli Securities, Inc., Gabelli Value Fund, Inc., Gamco Asset Management Inc., Gamco Investors Inc., Gaqbelli AVG Price 2, Ciri Gillispie, Goldentree Master Fund II, Ltd, Goldentree Master Fund Ltd. C/O Golden Tree Asset Management LP, Mario J. Gabelli, Gabelli & Company Inc., Gabelli Equity Trust, Inc., Gabelli Foundation, Inc., Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Gabelli Funds Inc.) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Gabelli) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (Th Gabelli Equity INC FD) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (The Gabelli Asset Fund) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc. (The Gabelli Global Multimed TR) Bruce M. Alpert, Gabelli Funds, Inc.(Gabelli ABC Fund), Goldentree Multistrategy Offshore Fund C/O Golden Tree Asset Management LP, Government Of Singapore Investment Corp PTE LTD, Ruth Gruenthal, Emanuel Gruss, Gryphon Hidden Values VIII LTD, Havens Partners Enhanced Fund, L.P., Havens Partners, L.P., Helen Buttenwieser Trust 7/28/38, Himan Brown, Homeland and Insurance Company Of New York C/O One Beacon Insurance Co., Polly H. Howells, Hudson Bay Fund LP, Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd., IBEW Local 25 Master Trust Plan, ITG Inc., Instinet Corp NY, Institutional Benchmarks Series (Master Feeder) Limited C/O LYRA Capital LLC, Investment Tech Group Inc., Iolaire Investors LLP C/O ASB Advisors LLC, Susan J Martin JT Ten, Jefferies & Company, Inc., Jerome & Maria Markowitz JTWROS, Alexander D Jtwros, Paula Solon Jtwros, Jonathan A. Knee, L3 Communication Corporation Master Trust, LaBranche & Co. LLC, Labranche Structured Products LLC, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Spear Leeds, Legg Mason Partners, Lenox Hill Hospital, Nancu G Lezette, Lighthouse Partners LLC/ LMA SPC OBO MAP I Segrgtn Prtf C/O Lighthouse Partners LLC, Lincoln FD Tax Advantage, FBO Anna Livingstone, Local 102 Pension/NO TR VAL IM, Michael Loeb, Loeb Arbitrage Management LP, M. Safra & Co., Inc., MACM 8, Thomas J. Majorana, Manufacturers & Traders Trust Co., Margaret T.M. Jones CP & CO AC, Mario J. Gabelli Gamco Investors Inc., Mergers INVTMT TRD, Mid Atlantic Capital Corp., Millenco LLC, Mitsubishi UFJ, Mitsubishi UFJ Asset MGMT #968364 (Through Master Trust Bank Of Japan)C/O Bank Of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Mitzuho Bank, Ltd., Monetary Authority/ Singapore, George M. Moss, Mr Violet and Mrs Leslie Payne Jtwros, Multi-Strategy Greenock Master Fund Ltd, Mutual Of Amer Life Ins COA/C Equity-Index Fund, NYC District Council Carpenters Pension, NYC District Council Carpenters Welfare, NYLIM-QS Large Cap Enhanced Fund LP, Natixis Bleichroeder LLC, Neuberger Berman Inc., New Eagle Holdings LLC Risk Arbitrage, New York City Deferred Compensation Plan, New York Estate Teacher's Retirement System, Newedge USA, LLC, Nomura Securities International Inc.-Stock Lending, Nomura Securities International, Inc., O' Shaugnessy, Pacific Select, Pension Commingle Fund, SWAPS, SBI, Pension Fund Association for Local Government Officials, Pension Trust Fund Local Union#27, Martha P. Pope, Martha Pope, Portfolio 1 Offshore Master LP LSV C/O GS & CO, Prime Broker CSSI Stock Split and Reorg Processing Account, QES QVT Fund LP, QVT Financial LP, QVT Fund, QVT Fund LP, R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC Master Deommissioning Trust, R.E. Ginna Qualified Decommissioning Trust, RIEF RMP LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, RIEF Trading LLC C/O Renaissance Technologies LLC, Rabo Capital Services, Inc., Risk Facil 99: Close /Risk, Robert E La Blanc, Royal Trust Corporation of Canada C/O Royal Bank of Canada, SG Americas Securities, LLC, SPX Principal Strategy U.S. Shares Programs, Safra & Co. Inc., Schultze Asset Mgmt, Secretaria to Mutual Benefit Association for Tokyo Metropolitan Employees, Robert A. Simins Jtwors, Jamie A. Simins Jtwros, Societe General Asset Management, Societe Generale Asset MGMT Co, Kellogg Shierley J Sperling, Stichting Pensioenfonds Van de C/O ABP Investments US, Inc., Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg C/O ABP Investments US, Inc., Stichting Pensionenfonds ABP C/O ABP Investments US, Inc., Stichting Pensionenfonds OCE C/O ABO Investments US, Inc., Strategic Funds, Inc., Strategic Opportunity BMO Nesbitt Burns C/O Adaly Investment Management Co., Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd. Trustee, Swiss American Securities Inc., Swiss Re Financial Products Corp., Systeia Capital Management C/O, T Rowe Price Balanced Fund, Inc., TRE Pension Eft Acct PPS, TRPTC TTEE Intersil Equity Inc. Fund, Tensor Opportunity Limited C. O M., The Merger Fund, The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd., Tocqueville Asset Management L.P., Tribune Co COM STK Tender EXP, William Sanderson Twaddell, U of T Master Trust C.O the Blackstone Group LP, U.S. Shares Programs, T Rowe Price Trust CO., T. Rowe Price Associates (Fourlard and CO), T. Rowe Price Associates C/O CT Corporation, T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., T. Rowe Price Trust Company, T.Rowe Price Associates, T.Rowe Price Associates (Cheetah+Co), T.Rowe Price Associates (Sherbet+Co), T.Rowe Price Associates (Taskforce & Co), T.Rowe Price Balanced Fund-Large Cap Core, T.Rowe Price Equity Income Trust C/O T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., T.Rowe Price Equity Index 500 Fund, T.Rowe Price Total Equity Market Index Fund, T.W. W Milton Jr, TD Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc., TD Emerald Pooled U.S. Fund C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc., TD Emerald U.S. Market Index Fund C/O TD Asset Management USA, Inc., TMS/ITS SETT A/C For HFF I LLC, TR UA 11/20/02 Himan Brown Revocable Trust, US Trust Co. N.A., University of Toronto C/O the Blackstone Group LP, Vilma L Chantilles JT Ten, Walker House SPV Ltd., Abigail Wallach, Eric D. Werthman, Jesse Werthman, White Mountains RE Bermuda Ltd C/O White Mountains Reinsurance Company of America, White Mountains Reinsurance Company Of America.Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company.(ft)
August 22, 2011 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Joinder and Notice of Removal on 8/22/11. Document filed by Government Of Singapore Investment Corp PTE LTD. (McCulloch, Scott)
August 22, 2011 Filing 80 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. no Corporate Parent. Document filed by Emanuel E. Geduld 2005 Family Trust.(Momborquette, David)
August 22, 2011 Filing 79 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. no Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cougar Trading, LLC.(Momborquette, David)
August 22, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Keith Momborquette on behalf of Cougar Trading, LLC, Emanuel E. Geduld 2005 Family Trust (Momborquette, David)
August 22, 2011 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Daniel H. Golden in Support re: #76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Golden, Daniel)
August 22, 2011 Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion for Limited Withdrawal and Limited Substitution of Counsel. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilm