National Basketball Association et al v. National Basketball Players Association et al Featured Case

The NBA sues the National Basketball Players' Association over the league's lockout and collective bargaining disagreements with the union.

Plaintiff: The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, Banner Seventeen LLC, National Basketball Association, Hoops, L.P., San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., Golden State Warriors, LLC, Dallas Basketball Limited, Madison Square Garden, L.P., Orlando Magic, Ltd., Atlanta Hawks, LP, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Rocket Ball, Ltd., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Washington Bullets, L.P., Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, The Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Pacers Basketball LLC, Milwaukee Bucks, Inc., Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Trail Blazers, Inc., The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, LAC Basketball Club, Inc., New Jersey Basketball LLC and Miami Heat Limited Partnership
Defendant: James Fredette, Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Etan Thomas, Chris Paul, Mike Dunleavy, National Basketball Players Association, Derek Fisher, Charles Jenkins, Maurice Evans, Roger Mason, Jr., Amar'e Stoudemire, Theo Ratliff and James Jones
Case Number: 1:2011cv05369
Filed: August 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/4/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 11, 2012 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 10/4/2011 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 9, 2011 Filing 54 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., Mike Dunleavy, Banner Seventeen LLC, Theo Ratliff, National Basketball Association, Washington Bullets, L.P., Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Etan Thomas, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Matt Bonner, The Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Milwaukee Bucks, Inc., New Jersey Basketball LLC, Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Rocket Ball, Ltd., Charles Jenkins, National Basketball Players Association, San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, Keyon Dooling, Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Maurice Evans, Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., Orlando Magic, Ltd., James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, Madison Square Garden, L.P., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, Atlanta Hawks, LP, Chris Paul, Pacers Basketball LLC, Trail Blazers, Inc., Amar'e Stoudemire, LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, Hoops, L.P., Dallas Basketball Limited.(Dreyer, Anthony)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeffrey A. Mishkin dated 11/28/2011 re: We are now in the process of reducing the tentative resolution to a comprehensive written agreement. To facilitate that process, we respectfully ask the Court to stay all proceedings in this matter until December 9, 2011. By that date, we will inform the Court whether the settlement has been concluded and, if it has, propose an appropriate order in accordance with Local Rule 77.1. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/28/2011) (djc)
November 23, 2011 Filing 52 Letter addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeffrey L. Kessler dated 11/23/2011 re: Based on the foregoing, as well as on all previous written and oral submissions to the Court, the NBA's complaint should be dismissed in its entirety. (djc)
November 16, 2011 Filing 51 Letter addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeffrey L. Kessler dated 11/15/2011 re: We write pursuant to Your Honor's request that defendants respond to the assertion in the NBA's November 14 letter that yesterday's announcement of the NBPA's disclaimer of interest and of the players' intention to file antitrust litigation against the NBA "moots the defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint as unripe for adjudication." Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas.(lmb)
November 16, 2011 Filing 50 Letter addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeffrey A. Mishkin dated 11/14/2011 re: This afternoon, as it has been threatening throughout the course of bargaining, defendant National Basketball Players Association (the "NBPA" or "Union") purported to disclaim interest in its role as the exclusive collective bargaining representative of the NBA players, and announced the players' intention to file antitrust litigation challenging the NBA lockout. A copy of the Union's disclaimer letter is attached to this letter. We submit that this announcement moots the defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint as unripe for adjudication. Document filed by Atlanta Hawks, LP, Banner Seventeen LLC, Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Dallas Basketball Limited, Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, Hoops, L.P., Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Milwaukee Bucks, Inc., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, National Basketball Association, New Jersey Basketball LLC, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Orlando Magic, Ltd., Pacers Basketball LLC, Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Rocket Ball, Ltd., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., The Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Trail Blazers, Inc., Washington Bullets, L.P.(lmb)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The Court sets the following schedule for supplemental letter briefing addressing whether the Complaint contains adequate factual allegations against (1) the individually named defendants, and (2) the Players Association, to pass muster under Ashcroft v. Iqbal and Bell Atlantic Corp. v. Twombly. Plaintiffs will submit their letter by November 14, 2011. Defendants' responsive letter is due by November 23, 2011. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/4/2011) (mro)
November 2, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2011 re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Derek Fisher, Amar'e Stoudemire, Mike Dunleavy, Matt Bonner, Maurice Evans, Chris Paul, James Jones, James Fredette, Theo Ratliff, Etan Thomas, National Basketball Players Association, Charles Jenkins, Keyon Dooling, Roger Mason, Jr.. (Court Reporter Guido Tascione) (mr)
October 27, 2011 Filing 48 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/4/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 27, 2011 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 10/4/2011 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/21/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 19, 2011 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Adam Silver in Opposition re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Atlanta Hawks, LP, Banner Seventeen LLC, Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Dallas Basketball Limited, Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, Hoops, L.P., Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Milwaukee Bucks, Inc., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, National Basketball Association, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Orlando Magic, Ltd., Pacers Basketball LLC, Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Rocket Ball, Ltd., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., The Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Trail Blazers, Inc., Washington Bullets, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (s) 1 Through 27, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mishkin, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Richard W. Buchanan in Opposition re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Atlanta Hawks, LP, Banner Seventeen LLC, Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Dallas Basketball Limited, Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, Hoops, L.P., Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Milwaukee Bucks, Inc., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, National Basketball Association, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Orlando Magic, Ltd., Pacers Basketball LLC, Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Rocket Ball, Ltd., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., The Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Trail Blazers, Inc., Washington Bullets, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (s) 1 Through 15, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mishkin, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Atlanta Hawks, LP, Banner Seventeen LLC, Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Dallas Basketball Limited, Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, Hoops, L.P., Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Milwaukee Bucks, Inc., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, National Basketball Association, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Orlando Magic, Ltd., Pacers Basketball LLC, Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Rocket Ball, Ltd., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., The Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Trail Blazers, Inc., Washington Bullets, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mishkin, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Ronald Klempner in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part I, #2 Exhibit A Part II)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 42 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Amar'e Stoudemire in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Charles Jenkins in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Chris Paul in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Derek Fisher in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Etan Thomas in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 36 DECLARATION of James Fredette in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 35 DECLARATION of James Jones in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Keyon Dooling in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Matt Bonner in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Maurice Evans in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Mike Dunleavy in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Roger Mason, Jr. in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Theo Ratliff in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 28 DECLARATION of G. William Hunter in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 27 DECLARATION of David L. Greenspan in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2011 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/7/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 13, 2011 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/7/2011 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 4, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/4/2011, ( Oral Argument set for 11/2/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) (mr)
September 27, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2011 at 10:15 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (rdz)
September 27, 2011 Filing 21 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeffrey L. Kessler dated 9/27/2011 re: We write on behalf of all of the parties in the above referenced matter to respectfully request that the September 28, 2011, 10:30 a.m. Rule 16 conference be rescheduled so that the parties may participate in a collective bargaining session that has been scheduled for that time. Your Honors Courtroom Deputy Clerk has informed the parties that Tuesday, October 4, 2011, 10:15 a.m. is available and has been reserved tbr this case subject to Your Honor's approval. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/27/2011) (rdz)
September 16, 2011 Filing 20 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jeffrey L. Kessler dated 9/16/2011 re: The parties write to request that the initial conference be rescheduled for 9/28/2011 at 10:30 AM and that the join case management statement be moved to 9/26/2011. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Initial Conference set for 9/28/2011 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/16/2011) (ab)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Defendants will submit their motion by September 16,2011. Plaintiffs' opposition will be submitted by October 10, 2011. Defendants' reply, if any, will be submitted by October 19, 2011. In addition, Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Court for an initial conference in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Thursday, September 22, at 3:45 p.m., in Courtroom 6B at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/14/2011) (rdz)
September 6, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexis Ayanna Hunter on behalf of Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hunter, Alexis)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Steven D. Wheeless, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion for admission pro hac vice in this matter is granted. The admitted attorney, Steven D. Wheeless, Esq., is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/30/2011) (ft)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Lawrence A. Katz, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion for admission pro hac vice in this matter is granted. The admitted attorney, Lawrence A. Katz, Esq., is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/30/2011) (ft)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for James F. Hibey, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion for admission pro hac vice in this matter is granted. The admitted attorney, James F. Hibey, Esq., is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/30/2011) (ft)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court will conduct a telephone conference in this matter on Wednesday, September 7, 2011 at 5:00p.m. Counsel for both sides are directed to call chambers ((212) 805- 0224) once on the line. ( Telephone Conference set for 9/7/2011 at 05:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/25/2011) (laq)
August 24, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, in the amount of $200.00, paid on 08/10/2011, Receipt Number 1013771. (jd)
August 24, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $600.00, paid on 08/10/2011, Receipt Number 1013691. (jd)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/22/2011) (lmb)
August 12, 2011 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul D. Clement (Docket Entry 11) on 8/10/11. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Atlanta Hawks, LP, Banner Seventeen LLC, Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Dallas Basketball Limited, Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, Hoops, L.P., Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Milwaukee Bucks, Inc., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, National Basketball Association, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Orlando Magic, Ltd., Pacers Basketball LLC, Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Rocket Ball, Ltd., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., The Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Trail Blazers, Inc., Washington Bullets, L.P.. (Dreyer, Anthony)
August 10, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION for Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Atlanta Hawks, LP, Banner Seventeen LLC, Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Dallas Basketball Limited, Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, Hoops, L.P., Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Milwaukee Bucks, Inc., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, National Basketball Association, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Orlando Magic, Ltd., Pacers Basketball LLC, Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Rocket Ball, Ltd., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., The Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Trail Blazers, Inc., Washington Bullets, L.P.(pgu)
August 10, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION for Steven D. Wheeless to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas.(pgu)
August 10, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION for Lawrence A. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas.(pgu)
August 10, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION for James F. Hibey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas.(pgu)
August 10, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Glassman on behalf of Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkins, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Glassman, Evan)
August 10, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Glassman on behalf of National Basketball Players Association (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Glassman, Evan)
August 4, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Greenspan on behalf of Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkings, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas (Greenspan, David)
August 4, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David G Feher on behalf of Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkings, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas (Feher, David)
August 4, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey L. Kessler on behalf of Matt Bonner, Keyon Dooling, Mike Dunleavy, Maurice Evans, Derek Fisher, James Fredette, Charles Jenkings, James Jones, Roger Mason, Jr, National Basketball Players Association, Chris Paul, Theo Ratliff, Amar'e Stoudemire, Etan Thomas (Kessler, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2011 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Bank of America and Wachovia Corporation, Gund Business Enterprises, Inc., LLC Sports, Inc., Zachary Hospitality Corporation, AT&T Media Holdings, Inc., Valero Service, Inc., IBC Capital Corporation, Southwest Business Corporation, Clear Channel Communications, Inc., K2 Inc., RDV Sports, Inc., Heico Holding Inc, Heisley Member, Inc., FBA II, Inc., MSG Eden Corporation, Philadelphia 76ers, Inc., Aramark RBI, Inc., Cablevision Systems Corporation, Comcast Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Hoops, L.P., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Orlando Magic, Ltd., Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Rocket Ball, Ltd., San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C..(rdz) Modified on 8/3/2011 (rdz). (rdz).
August 2, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
August 2, 2011 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (rdz)
August 2, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (rdz)
August 2, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401012952)Document filed by Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., Banner Seventeen LLC, National Basketball Association, Washington Bullets, L.P., Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., The Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Milwaukee Bucks, Inc., Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Rocket Ball, Ltd., San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., Orlando Magic, Ltd., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, Atlanta Hawks, LP, Pacers Basketball LLC, LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Trail Blazers, Inc., Dallas Basketball Limited, Hoops, L.P., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP.(rdz) (rdz).
August 2, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401012952)Document filed by Philadelphia 76ERS L.P., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., Banner Seventeen LLC, National Basketball Association, Washington Bullets, L.P., Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., The Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Milwaukee Bucks, Inc., Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Rocket Ball, Ltd., San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., Orlando Magic, Ltd., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, Atlanta Hawks, LP, Pacers Basketball LLC, LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Trail Blazers, Inc., Dallas Basketball Limited, Hoops, L.P., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP.(rdz) (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Basketball Association et al v. National Basketball Players Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banner Seventeen LLC
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Basketball Association
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoops, L.P.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden State Warriors, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Basketball Limited
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Square Garden, L.P.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Magic, Ltd.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlanta Hawks, LP
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocket Ball, Ltd.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Bullets, L.P.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia 76ERS L.P.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Professional Basketball Club, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacers Basketball LLC
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milwaukee Bucks, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobcats Basketball, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detroit Pistons Basketball Company
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trail Blazers, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Los Angeles Lakers, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAC Basketball Club, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Jersey Basketball LLC
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami Heat Limited Partnership
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Dreyer
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fredette
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Bonner
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keyon Dooling
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etan Thomas
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Paul
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Dunleavy
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Basketball Players Association
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Fisher
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Jenkins
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Evans
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Mason, Jr.
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amar'e Stoudemire
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theo Ratliff
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jones
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: James F. Hibey
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Steven D. Wheeless
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Katz
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Evan Glassman
Represented By: Alexis Ayanna Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?