HOGLAN et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al Featured Case

Families who lost loved ones in the September 11th, 2001 a/k/a 9/11 terrorist attacks sue Iran for more than $1 billion for compensatory and punitive damages for being a state sponsor of terrorism under an exception to the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, and the Alien Tort Claims Act

Plaintiff: Jack Bradish, Alice Hoglan, Loretta Haines, Cirilo Fernandez, Daniel Huber, Addison Friedman, Tina Grazioso, Raymond Woods, Lisa Smith, Diane Lostrangio, Heather Strickland, Alexander Rowe, Grace Parkinson-godshalk, Dov Shefi, Angela LeGrand, all plaintiffs, Rachel G. Malubay, Vincent Pappasso, Diane Smith, Jennie Mandelino, Brenda Jobe, Jane G. Haller, Jessica Kramer, Maria Joule, Anthony Friedman-Ceraso, Tawanda Smith, Candyce Sue Hoglan, Tony Pino, Charles Edward Gengler, Dian Dembinski, Audrey Model, Diane Ognibene, Emma Fernandez Regan, Lance Ward, Susan Bohan, Anthony Dorf, Jeannette Diehl, Vaughn V. Hoglan, Brian Major, Christi Pendergraft, Julie Bertelsen Hoglan, Kelly Arthurs, James Montoya, Nicholas Chirchirillo, Carole Grazioso, Michelle Baker, Patricia Caloia, John Haller, Krysty Grazioso, Karen Bingham, Kristen Druckenmiller, Karen Ventre, Michael Edward Paige, Yishai Shefi, Alice Hoagland, Donna Corbett-Moran, Mike Smith, Joanann Coale, Karen Cofresi, Scott Woods, Geraldine Deborah Spaeter, Richard Fernandez, Steve Gengler, Nina Fuller, Carolee Azzarello, Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan, Jeannette Coffey, Jason Diehl, Norma Ward, Pedro Gerardino, Kristyn Steiner Martin, Kaitlin Steiner Keller, Hoglan Plaintiffs, Gary Reiss, Paul Rowe, Joseph Carpeneto, Anthony Borzumato, Kathryn Halvorson, James Mandelino, Sr., Rachael Logan, James Mandelino, Jr., Danielle Smith, Sandra Grazioso, Sigal Asher-Shefi, JoAnne Lovett, Troia Johnson, John Bradish, Colleen Mcdonald, Vicki Lynn Michel, Esther Rivka-Shefi, Anthony Pino, Leslie Coale Brown, Martin Smith, Gabriella Rinehart, Herbert Hoglan, Mary Anne Pino, Karen Moreno, Lee N. Hoglan, Michael Chirchirillo, Marc Ward, Kathryn Collman, Stephen Bradish, Mateo Pino, D. Linden Hoglan, Gail Smith, Stephanie Feher, Jason Smith, Pazit Baum-Shefi, Michelle Clendenney, Aleese M. Hartmann, Arline Peabody, Renee L. Gamboa, Keith Bradkowski and Carolyn Sutton
Defendant: Ansar bank, Mehr bank, Bonyad Taavon Sepah, Pars oil & gas company, Liner transport kish, Iranian ministry of defense and armed force logistics, Moallem insurance company, Iran Airlines, Iranian Ministry of Petroleum, National iranian petrochemical company, Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, all defendants, National iranian oil corporation, Islamic Republic of Iran, Iranian Ministry of Commerce, Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, Iranian Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei, Mehr finance and credit institute, Bonyad-e ta, Irgc cooperative foundation, Ansar financial and credit institute, Ansar finance and credit fund, Iranian Ministry of Information and Security, National iranian gas company, Sepah cooperative foundation, National iranian tanker corporation, Ltk, Pogc, Islamic Republic of Iran Shipping Lines, Central bank of the islamic republic of iran, Hezbollah and Mehr interest-free bank
Case Number: 1:2011cv07550
Filed: October 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: M 22-1 Designation by U.S. Attorney of individual to accept service of summons and complaint
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Filing 312 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUPPLEMENTAL of two copies of the Letters Rogatory Request (Hoglan Docket No. 282-1), Letters Rogatory Order (Hoglan Docket No.293), translations of all the above documents and certifications by the translator mailed to Michael McPherson, Paralegal Specialist, U.S. Department of State, Overseas Citizens Services, Office of Legal Affairs, SA 17, Tenth Floor, Washington, DC. 20522 on 5/02/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7750 2523 1418, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B) for service on defendant Hezbollah. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Kamal, Edressa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 311 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING- SUPPLEMENTAL of two copies of the Letters Rogatory Request (Hoglan Docet No. 282-1), Letters Rogatory Order (Hoglan Docket No. 293) (in English and Farsi), certifications by the translators mailed to Michael McPherson, Paralegal Specialist, U.S. Department of State, Overseas Citizens Services, Office of Legal Affairs, SA 17, Tenth Floor, Washington, D.C. 20522 on 05/02/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7750 2523 0683, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B) for service on defendant National Iranian Tanker Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Roberts, Melina)
May 8, 2019 Filing 310 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING- SUPPLEMENTAL of two copies of the Letters Rogatory Request (Hoglan Docet No. 282-1), Letters Rogatory Order (Hoglan Docket No. 293) (in English and Farsi), certifications by the translators mailed to Michael McPherson, Paralegal Specialist, U.S. Department of State, Overseas Citizens Services, Office of Legal Affairs, SA 17, Tenth Floor, Washington, D.C. 20522 on 05/02/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7750 2523 0710, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B) for service on defendant National Iranian Oil Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Roberts, Melina)
May 8, 2019 Filing 309 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUPPLEMENTAL of two copies of the Letters Rogatory Request (Hoglan Docket No. 282-1), Letters Rogatory Order (Hoglan Docket No.293), translations of all the above documents and certifications by the translator mailed to Michael McPherson, Paralegal Specialist, U.S. Department of State, Overseas Citizens Services, Office of Legal Affairs, SA 17, Tenth Floor, Washington, DC. 20522 on 05/02/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7750 2523 0937, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B) for service on defendant, Iran Airlines. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Kamal, Edressa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 308 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUPPLEMENTAL of two copies of the Letters Rogatory Request (Hoglan Docket No. 282-1), Letters Rogatory Order (Hoglan Docket No.293), translations of all the above documents and certifications by the translator mailed to Michael McPherson, Paralegal Specialist, U.S. Department of State, Overseas Citizens Services, Office of Legal Affairs, SA 17, Tenth Floor, Washington, DC. 20522 on 5/02/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7750 2523 0569, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B) for service on defendant, National Iranian Petrochemical Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Kamal, Edressa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 307 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING- SUPPLEMENTAL of two copies of the Letters Rogatory Request (Hoglan Docet No. 282-1), Letters Rogatory Order (Hoglan Docket No. 293) (in English and Farsi), certifications by the translators mailed to Michael McPherson, Paralegal Specialist, U.S. Department of State, Overseas Citizens Services, Office of Legal Affairs, SA 17, Tenth Floor, Washington, D.C. 20522 on 05/02/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7750 2520 5189, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B) for service on defendant Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Roberts, Melina)
May 8, 2019 Filing 306 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUPPLEMENTAL of two copy of the Letters Rogatory Request (Hoglan Docket No. 282-1), Letters Rogatory Order (Hoglan Docket No.293), translations of all the above documents and certifications by the translator mailed to Michael McPherson, Paralegal Specialist, U.S. Department of State, Overseas Citizens Services, Office of Legal Affairs, SA 17, Tenth Floor, Washington, DC. 20522 on 5/02/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7750 2523 1017, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B) for service on defendant National Iranian Gas Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Kamal, Edressa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 305 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING- SUPPLEMENTAL of two copies of the Letters Rogatory Request (Hoglan Docet No. 282-1), Letters Rogatory Order (Hoglan Docket No. 293) (in English and Farsi), certifications by the translators mailed to Michael McPherson, Paralegal Specialist, U.S. Department of State, Overseas Citizens Services, Office of Legal Affairs, SA 17, Tenth Floor, Washington, D.C. 20522 on 05/02/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7749 8866 3900, to the head of the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(b)(3)(B) for service on defendant Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Roberts, Melina)
March 1, 2019 Filing 304 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom., (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy B. Fleming, #2 Exhibit Havlish Public Comments on USVSST Fund interpretations 6.29.16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 303 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (231 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 3838 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Notice of Appeal, filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. USCA Case Number 17-4035-cv. UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the June 20, 2017 and November 17, 2017 orders are AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 2/1/2019. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(nd)
January 25, 2019 Filing 302 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran; U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015(Hoglan Docket No. 89); Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2; Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027); Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111); Report and Recommendation #1 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171); Report and Recommendation #2 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172); Report and Recommendation #3 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374); Partial Order and Judgment entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633); Report and Recommendation #4 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795); Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905); Text of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.; Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form, Certified Farsi Translations of all the above documents along with affidavits of translators and Letters Rogatory mailed to Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani c/o H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 1/25/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7742 0789 3114, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(smc)
January 25, 2019 Filing 301 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran; U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York Clerks Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89); Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2; Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027); Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111); Report and Recommendation #1 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171); Report and Recommendation #2 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172); Report and Recommendation #3 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374); Partial Order and Judgment entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633); Report and Recommendation #4 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795); Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905); Text of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.; Right to Appeal Notice; Right to Appeal Form; Certified Farsi Translation of all above documents along with affidavits of the translators; and Letters Rogatory mailed to National Iranian Petrochemical Company c/o H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 1/25/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 774207893412, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Roberts, Melina)
January 25, 2019 Filing 300 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran; U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015(Hoglan Docket No. 89); Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2; Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027); Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111); Report and Recommendation #1 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171); Report and Recommendation #2 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172); Report and Recommendation #3 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374); Partial Order and Judgment entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633); Report and Recommendation #4 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795); Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905); Text of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.; Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form, Certified Farsi Translations of all the above documents along with affidavits of translators and Letters Rogatory mailed to National Iranian Tanker Corporation c/o H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 1/25/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7742 0789 2931, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(smc)
January 25, 2019 Filing 299 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran; U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York Clerks Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89); Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2; Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027); Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111); Report and Recommendation #1 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171); Report and Recommendation #2 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172); Report and Recommendation #3 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374); Partial Order and Judgment entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383);Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384);Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633);Report and Recommendation #4 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795); Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905);Text of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.;Right to Appeal Notice; Right to Appeal Form; the certified Farsi translation of all the above documents and an affidavit of the translators mailed to Hezbollah c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue Tehran, Iran on 1/25/0219 by Federal Express tracking # 774207894040, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Kamal, Edressa) Modified on 1/25/2019 (Kamal, Edressa). (Main Document 299 replaced on 1/25/2019) (Kamal, Edressa).
January 24, 2019 Filing 298 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran; U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York Clerks Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89); Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2; Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027); Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111); Report and Recommendation #1 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171); Report and Recommendation #2 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172); Report and Recommendation #3 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374); Partial Order and Judgment entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383);Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384);Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633);Report and Recommendation #4 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795); Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905);Text of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.;Right to Appeal Notice; Right to Appeal Form; the certified Farsi translation of all the above documents and an affidavit of the translators mailed to Iran Airlines, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue Tehran, Iran on 1/24/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 774207893802, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Kamal, Edressa) Modified on 1/25/2019 (Kamal, Edressa).
January 24, 2019 Filing 297 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran; U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York Clerks Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89);Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2; Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027); Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111); Report and Recommendation #1 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171);Report and Recommendation #2 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172); Report and Recommendation #3 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374); Partial Order and Judgment entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383);Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633); Report and Recommendation #4 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219);Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795);Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905);Text of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.;Right to Appeal Notice; Right to Appeal Form,Certified Farsi Translation of all above documents along with affidavits of the translators,Letters Rogatory. mailed to National Iranian Gas Company, c/o H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 1/24/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 774207892953, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Roberts, Melina)
January 24, 2019 Filing 295 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran; U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York Clerks Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89); Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2; Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027); Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111); Report and Recommendation #1 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171); Report and Recommendation #2 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172); Report and Recommendation #3 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374); Partial Order and Judgment entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383);Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384);Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633);Report and Recommendation #4 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795); Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905);Text of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.;Right to Appeal Notice; Right to Appeal Form; the certified Farsi translation of all the above documents and an affidavit of the translators mailed to National Iranian Oil Corporation, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue Tehran, Iran on 1/24/0219 by Federal Express tracking #774207893011, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Kamal, Edressa) (Main Document 295 replaced on 1/25/2019) (Kamal, Edressa). Modified on 1/25/2019 (Kamal, Edressa).
January 24, 2019 Filing 294 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran; U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015(Hoglan Docket No. 89); Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2; Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027); Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111); Report and Recommendation #1 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171); Report and Recommendation #2 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172); Report and Recommendation #3 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374); Partial Order and Judgment entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633); Report and Recommendation #4 by U.S. Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219); Memorandum Decision and Order entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795); Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by U.S. District Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905); Text of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.; Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form, Certified Farsi Translations of all the above documents along with affidavits of translators and Letters of Rogatory mailed to Ayatollah ali hoseini-Khamenei c/o H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran Iran on 1/24/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7742 0789 2460, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (smc)
January 17, 2019 LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED on January 17, 2019, and picked up by WIGGINS CHILDS PANTAZIS FISHER GOLDFARB PLLC, and to obtain documents on the following defendants (1) Ayatollah Ali Hoseini Khamenei, Supreme Leader of Iran; (2) Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, Chairman, Expediency Discernment Counsel and former President of Iran; (3) National Iranian Tanker Corporation; (4) National Iranian Oil Corporation; (5) National Iranian Gas Corporation; (6) National Iranian Petrochemical Company; (7) Iran Airlines; and, (8) Hezbollah. (km)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting (4184) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (282) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN. Upon consideration of the Plaintiffs' Motion, and the accompanying Memorandum of Law and exhibits, it is hereby ORDERED and DECREED that Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED...The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 4184 (03-MDL-01570) and 282 (11-CV-07550). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN. (ras)
January 4, 2019 Filing 292 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 3, 2019 Filing 291 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Timothy B. Fleming dated January 3, 2019 re: Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Document filed by Alice Hoglan.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 289 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 288 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 287 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 286 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 285 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form mailed to The Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter -Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 08/01/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863801448, as per #269 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (ekk)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran, c/o H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 08/01/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863800967, as per #267 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (ekk) Modified on 12/11/2018 (Kamal, Edressa).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89),Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015(MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017(MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8,2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form mailed to The Iranian Ministry of Information and Security, c/o H.E Mohammad Javid Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 08/01/2018 by Federal Express tracking #772863800577, as per #268 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office.(ekk) Modified on 12/11/2018 (Kamal, Edressa).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Net burn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum De cision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form mailed to The Iranian Ministry of Petroleum, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 08/01/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863801676, as per #270 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (smc)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Mailed to The Iranian Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 08/01/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863802190, as per #271 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (Roberts, Melina)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Net burn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Mailed to The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 08/01/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863802845, as per #274 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (Roberts, Melina)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Net burn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et se q., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form mailed to The Iranian Ministry of Commerce, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 08/01/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863802433, as per #272 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (smc)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Ho glan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Net burn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hog lan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum De cision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge G eorge B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et se q., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Mailed to The Iranian Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 08/01/2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863802981, as per #273 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. (smc)
November 26, 2018 Filing 284 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in long form or in altered short form addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Timothy B. Fleming dated 11/26/2018. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
September 18, 2018 Filing 283 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (282 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory as to (1) Ayatollah Ali Khamenei, Supreme Leader of Iran; (2) Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, Chairman, Expediency Discernment Counsel and former President of Iran; (3) National Iranian Tanker Corporation; (4) N ational Iranian Oil Corporation; (5) National Iranian Gas Corporation; (6) National Iranian Petrochemical Company; (7) Iran Airlines; and (8) Hezbollah. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
September 18, 2018 Filing 282 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory as to (1) Ayatollah Ali Khamenei, Supreme Leader of Iran; (2) Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, Chairman, Expediency Discernment Counsel and former President of Iran; (3) National Iranian Tanker Corporation; (4) National Iranian Oil Corporation; (5) National Iranian Gas Corporation; (6) National Iranian Petrochemical Company; (7) Iran Airlines; and, (8) Hezbollah in Switzerland (via diplomatic channel) for service upon Islamic Republic of Iran. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Letters Rogatory, #2 Exhibit State Dept letter to Clerk of Court, #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3742 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' October 2017 motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3742) is DENIED. By September 28, 2018, Jelaidan is ORDERED to file a sworn declaration with the Court providing detailed responses to the questions listed above. In addition, a conference is scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. McMahon and the relevant members of the PECs are ORDERED to appear at the conference in person. The parties should be prepared to discuss the PECs' May 2018 motion for sanctions and McMahon's motion to withdraw. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3742. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 OPINION AND ORDER re: (4064 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (4043) Memorandum & Opinion, filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. The Charity Officials' motion for reconsideration is DENIED. In addition, Mr. Alan Kabat, the Charity Officials' attorneys from Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC, and the appropriate representatives from the PECs are ORDERED to appear in person at the discovery conference scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Court intends to discuss why Mr. Kabat made representations on behalf of Al-Turki and Naseef during periods of time when he was not in communication with those clients. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4064. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3910 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Defendants, World Assembly of Muslim Youth-Saudi Arabia and World Assembly of Muslim Youth-International to to produce responsive documents pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a), filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 7 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to provide the PECs with a complete list of all of its branch offices from 1992 until 2002. Within 14 days of this Opinion and Order, the PECs are directed to provide WAMY with a list of no more than 20 branch offices that the PECs believe are most relevant to their claims. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to conduct a more thorough search for documents located in the 20 branch offices that the PECs identify and to produce any additional relevant documents. In addition, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to search for and produce the following: all documents responsive to the PECs' fourth set of document requests; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; WAMY's annual reports for 1992, 1993, and 1995; all documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government, Saudi ministries, and Saudi embassies; all documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; all records regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad; and unredacted versions of all documents that WAMY has previously produced in redacted form (with the exception of any documents listed on a privilege log). Finally, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration describing in detail its efforts to locate: additional documents in its branch offices; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government; documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; and documents regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3910. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/29/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER denying (817) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4077) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (450) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (626) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (579) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (392) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (607) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (50) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (62) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (91) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (76) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (56) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (53) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (54) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (33) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (46) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (36) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (30) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (29) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (1024) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (391) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. The Kingdom's motion to supplement the protective order is DENIED. The Court will not adopt the procedures the Kingdom has proposed. Instead, the parties are directed to comply with the existing protective order, ECF No. 1900, and the Court's Individual Practices when they wish to file any information with the Court that has been designated as confidential. The Court's temporary order prohibiting parties from filing any documents on the docket that have been designated as confidential by the Kingdom (ECF No. 4079) is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4077. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3822 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions, filed by Plaintiffs PI Executive Committee, Plaintiffs Executive Committees, (3827 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Muslim World League and International Islamic Relief Organization to Produce Responsive Documents, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3822) is DENIED as untimely. In addition, the PECs' motion to compel (ECF No. 3827) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, MWL and IIRO are ORDERED to search all of the branch offices that they have not already searched and produce any banking records from those offices and any documents falling within the categories identified in the Court's April 12, 2011 Order. MWL and IIRO are not required to search for any other documents at this time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3822 and 3827. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 OPINION AND ORDER re: (872 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 3823 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to to produce documents, filed by Kathleen Ashton, (3830 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to Document Production, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, Kadi is ORDERED to search for and produce the two reports discussed above that were prepared in anticipation of Rowad's liquidation and the 11 documents discussed above regarding Saudi Arabia's investigations of Kadi. If he is unable to locate or obtain all of these reports and documents, Kadi is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order that describes in detail his efforts to locate the reports and documents. Kadi is not required to produce any other documents at this time. In addition, within 30 days of this Opinion and Order, the parties are directed to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to resolve the disputes regarding Kadi's privilege log. Finally, the PECs' request for attorneys' fees is treated as withdrawn, and Kadi's request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3823, 3830 in the MDL and ECF No. 872 in 02-CV-6977. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (4073) Letter Motion for Discovery; denying (4074) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The motions for protective orders filed by Al-Buthe, Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, and Basha are DENIED, and Naseef's motion for a protective order is DENIED as moot. In addition, Naseef is ORDERED to file a letter within 60 days of the date of this Order and every 60 days thereafter updating the Court on the status of his medical conditions and ability to participate in this action. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 4073 and 4074. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Also enclosed is a money order in the amount of $2,275.00 mailed to The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on August 1, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863802845, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Also enclosed is a money order in the amount of $2,275.00 mailed to The Iranian Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on August 1, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863802981, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Also enclosed is a money order in the amount of $2,275.00 mailed to The Iranian Ministry of Commerce, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on August 1, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863802433, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Also enclosed is a money order in the amount of $2,275.00 mailed to The Iranian Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on August 1, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863802190, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Also enclosed is a money order in the amount of $2,275.00 mailed to The Iranian Ministry of Petroleum, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on August 1, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863801676, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Also enclosed is a money order in the amount of $2,275.00 mailed to The Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, c/o H.E Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on August 1, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863801448, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca) Modified on 8/2/2018 (jca).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Also enclosed is a money order in the amount of $2,275.00 mailed to The Iranian Ministry of Information and Security, c/o H.E Mohammad Javid Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on August 1, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863800577, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca) Modified on 8/2/2018 (jca).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Cover Letter to Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Islamic Republic of Iran, U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern District of N.Y. Clerk's Certificate of Default, dated March 17, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 89), Notice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment Regarding Liability entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (MDL Docket No. 3027), Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered by Judge George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015 (Hoglan Docket No. 111), Report and Recommendation #1 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 12, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 171), Report and Recommendation #2 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 14, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 172), Report and Recommendation #3 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated October 24, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3374), Partial Order and Judgment entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (Hoglan Docket No. 178), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3383), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 (MDL Docket No. 3384), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on June 21, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3633), Report and Recommendation #4 by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, dated August 8, 2017 (Hoglan Docket No. 219), Memorandum Decision and Order entered by Judge George B. Daniels on November 17, 2017 (MDL Docket No. 3795), Final Order and Judgment on Compensatory Damages entered by Judge George B. Daniels on February 26, 2018 (MDL Docket No. 3905), Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq., Right to Appeal Notice; and Right to Appeal Form. Also enclosed is a money order in the amount of $2,275.00 mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran, c/o H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on August 1, 2018 by Federal Express tracking # 772863800967, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jca) Modified on 8/2/2018 (jca).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 8/27/2018, Doc. #4125 in case 1:03-md-1570. ORDER: No party shall publicly file any document on the docket designated as Confidential by the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ("KSA") while the Court considers KSA's letter motion dated July 31, 2018. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees may respond to KSA's letter motion by August 8, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/1/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras) Modified on 8/28/2018 (ras).
July 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/3/2018. Replies due by 8/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER: On July 20, 2018, Defendants Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid, Abdullah Mahsen Al-Turki, Adnan Basha, and Abdullah Omar Naseef moved the Court to reconsider a portion of its July 6, 2018 Opinion and Order. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees may file a response to the motion by August 3, 2018. The defendants may file a reply by August 10, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
July 12, 2018 Filing 264 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of DHL packages with Final Judgment and Notice of Appeal Rights served on Mohammad Javad Zarif on June 2, 2018. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Receipts Part 1 of 3, #2 Receipts Part 2 of 3, #3 Receipts Part 3 of 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 AMENDED ORDER APPROVING NOTICES TO CONFORM, SHORT FORM COMPLAINTS, AND NOTICES OF AMENDMENT: The Court has previously issued several orders approving forms and setting procedures for the filing of new claims against the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ("Saudi Arabia") and the Islamic Republic of Iran ("Iran"). ECF Nos. 3543, 3982, 4010. Because of the piecemeal manner in which the various types of new claims have been addressed, the applicable forms and procedures have become convoluted and inconsistent. In addition, the plaintiffs have sought to find ways of adding more plaintiffs to a single case than the Court intended by utilizing a combination of short form complaints and notices of amendment. The Court is attempting to manage the influx of new cases and claims in the most efficient and organized manner possible. To that end, the Court will now establish new procedures governing all newly filed claims against Iran and Saudi Arabia. This Amended Order supersedes ECF Nos. 3543, 3982, and 4010 in their entirety. The parties are directed to adhere to both the letter and spirit of these procedures. In addition, any plaintiff wishing to withdraw from the case must seek leave from the Court to dismiss his or her claims in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Civil Rules, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/10/2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(jwh)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 OPINION AND ORDER re: (546 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN, 987 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 3748 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 774 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 571 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 850 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 630 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN, 582 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions - Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Sanctions as to Charity Official Defendants Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid, Abdullah Mahsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, and Soliman Al-Buthe. filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. For the foregoing reasons, the PECs' motion for sanctions is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef are precluded from offering any testimony or further evidence, other than such evidence that has been produced as of the date of this Opinion and Order, to rebut admissible evidence offered by a party to establish these defendants' whereabouts on a particular date. In addition, Defendants Al-Buthe, Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef are ORDERED to produce certifications that fully comply with the Courts orders within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order. The certifications from Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef must describe the specific medical issues that have prevented them from fulfilling their discovery obligations in a timely manner, and the certifications from Al-Turki and Naseef must indicate whether they are continuing to participate in this litigation. In the alternative, if Al-Turki, Basha, or Naseef is incapacitated, that defendant may produce a competent sworn or affirmed certification from a qualified treating physician identifying the specific medical issues that have prevented the defendant from fulfilling his discovery obligations. If defense counsel is unable to contact Al-Turki and Naseef, counsel must file a letter with the Court within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order describing his efforts to contact his clients and indicating when he last had contact with them. The Court will then consider whether a default should be entered against them. If the Charity Officials remain noncompliant with the Court's orders, the Court may impose additional sanctions and may order them to show cause why they should not be held in contempt. Finally, the Court will require the Charity Officials to pay the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs that the PECs incurred in bringing their motion for sanctions. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to reach agreement on the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, the parties shall file a joint status letter indicating whether they have agreed upon the attorneys' fees and costs that should be imposed. If the parties have not reached agreement, the status letter should propose a reasonable schedule for briefing on the amount of the attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3748. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/6/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ne)
June 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (4013 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 73 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:17-cv-06519-GBD, 70 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN, 617 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 599 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 29 in 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN, 16 in 1:18-cv-00538-GBD, 57 in 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN, 442 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 41 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD, 385 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 48 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD, 25 in 1:17-cv-08617-GBD, 56 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN, 81 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 386 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 64 in 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN, 74 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN, 64 in 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:18-cv-03162-GBD, 1017 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 13 in 1:18-cv-03353-GBD, 804 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 80 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 573 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 47 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD, 42 in 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN, 51 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:18-cv-00947-GBD, 54 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 34 in 1:17-cv-07914-GBD) MOTION for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15144016. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Superseded by Judge's Order dated 7/10/2018, Doc. #4045 in case 1:03-md-1570. ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; terminating (4007) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The Court hereby approves the Iran Short Form Complaint, ECF No. 4007-1, and Ashton Short Form Saudi Arabia Complaint, ECF No. 4007-2, and further orders as follows: Iran Short Form Complaint. Any plaintiff who has not yet filed a claim against Iran, but intends to do so, may initiate an action against Iran through the filing of an Iran Short Form Complaint, substantially in the form attached as Exhibit A to the PECs' May 23, 2018 Letter, ECF No. 4007-1...As new complaints are being filed against Saudi Arabia, the Court would like to put all plaintiffs on notice that, in the event that liability is ultimately established against Saudi Arabia, solatium claimants shall be required to present documentary evidence of their family relationship to a 9/11 decedent for the Court's review. Such evidence would consist of birth or marriage certificates or, in their absence, sworn affidavits attesting to a family relationship eligible for recovery. For deceased solatium claimants, a death certificate or sworn affidavit shall be requested to ensure that the claimant did not predecease the 9/11 victim. Cf. ECF No. 3442, 3445 (orders vacating judgments against Islamic Republic of Iran and dismissing claims of solatium claimants who had pre-deceased victims). Although liability and damages are bifurcated in this case, the Court strongly encourages all plaintiffs to gather the necessary documentation before or shortly after the filing or amendment of their complaints because such documentation may be more difficult to obtain with the passage of time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4007, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras) Modified on 8/28/2018 (ras).
May 25, 2018 Filing 259 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Hezbollah on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569195042, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 258 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569180261, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 257 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Iran's Ministry of Information and Security on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569184564, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 256 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569185463, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 255 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Iran's Ministry of Petroleum on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569187062, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 254 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Iran's Ministry of Commerce on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569187585, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 253 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Iran's Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569188532, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 252 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Iran's Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569189033, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 251 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569189733, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 250 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569191612, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 249 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to National Iranian Oil Corporation on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569192441, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 248 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to National Iranian Tanker Corporation on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569192931, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 247 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to National Iranian Gas Company on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569193292, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 246 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to National Iranian Petrochemical Company on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569193675, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 245 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Iran Airlines on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569193981, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 25, 2018 Filing 244 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the See Attached Rider mailed to Central Bank of Iran on May 25, 2018 by DHL tracking # 2569194390, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jca)
May 23, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document numbers [244, 245, 246, 247, 248, 249, 250, 251, 252, 253, 254, 255, 256, 257, 258, 259] Clerk Certificate of Mailing. The documents were docketed in error. (jca)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' motion to modify the procedures for adding or removing plaintiffs to or from existing cases without seeking further leave from the Court is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. A new plaintiff asserting claims for solatium damages with respect to a deceased family member may be added to the existing case of the decedent's estate without seeking further leave from the Court by (1) filing a Notice of Amendment in the form attached hereto as Exhibit A, and then (2) adding the new plaintiff's name to the docket of the existing case on ECF. Names added onto the docket must be in First Name Last Name format, with only first letters capitalized (i.e., not written in all capitalized letters). No more than 25 new plaintiffs may be added to an existing case with a single Notice of Amendment. Attorneys wishing to add new plaintiffs using this procedure are strongly encouraged to contact the Clerk of Court and make arrangements to send members of their technical staff to court-sponsored training regarding the proper protocols for adding new plaintiffs to existing dockets. Plaintiffs added by this procedure need not re-serve defendants who have already been served. Any motion previously ruled on by the Court will be considered to have been filed and decided in the same manner and shall apply with equal force with regard to the claims of each new plaintiff. All other new plaintiffs must follow the procedures established in the Court's May 3, 2017 and January 24, 2018 Orders. ECF Nos. 3543, 3883 (in case no. 03md1570). Any plaintiff wishing to withdraw from the case must seek leave from the Court to dismiss his or her claims in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Civil Rules. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3943 (in case no. 03md1570). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/27/2018). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al., as per Chambers. This Order is a duplicate of doc. no. 3982 entered in case no. 03md1570. (rjm)
March 22, 2018 Filing 243 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (3939 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Letter filed by Dubai Islamic Bank. ENDORSEMENT: Attorney Robert G. Houck's motion to withdraw as counsel for Dubai Islamic Bank is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Attorney Houck as counsel. Attorney Robert G. Houck terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/22/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ap)
February 26, 2018 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (jwh)
February 26, 2018 Filing 242 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO RULE 41 WITHOUT PREJUDICE: NOW COME the Hoglan Plaintiffs and, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i)-(ii) governing the voluntary dismissal of parties by a plaintiff, hereby file this Stipulation to dismiss al-Qaeda and the Estate of Osama bin Laden from the above-captioned action. Neither al-Qaeda nor the Estate of Osama bin Laden have entered an appearance, or filed an Answer to the Hoglan Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, or any other pleading. Further, no Defendant in this action has entered an appearance or answered any filed pleading. The undersigned counsel files this unopposed Stipulation to dismiss only these two above-referenced defendants from this action, in conformance with the above-cited Rule. This Stipulation of Dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(B). (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(jwh)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGEMENT ON COMPENSATORY DAMAGES: It is HEREBY ORDERED that the final compensatory damages judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs, comprised of the thirteen (13) Decedent's Estate Plaintiffs and the two hundred, three (203) Individual Family Members Plaintiffs listed in this Order and Judgment, and against all sixteen (16) Defendants listed above; and, it is FURTHER ORDERED that such Plaintiffs are awarded: (1) economic compensatory damages to the thirteen (13) Decedent's Estate Plaintiffs in the aggregate amount of $469,465,035, as more specifically set forth below; (2) compensatory damages for pain and suffering of $2,000,000 per Decedent's Estate Plaintiff for a total of $26,000,000, as more specifically set forth below; (3) compensatory damages for solatium to the Individual Family Members Plaintiffs totaling $1,346,375,000, as more specifically set forth herein below; and, (4) prejudgment interest on the amount of $1,372,375,000 awarded herein for compensatory pain and suffering and solatium damages from September 11, 2001, to the date of judgment at the rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually; and, it is FURTHER ORDERED that each and every one of the Defendants is jointly and severally liable for the entire JUDGMENT on compensatory damages; and, it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for punitive damages is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to being considered in conjunction with the same issue in other cases in the multi-district litigation captioned In Re: Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, 1:03 MDL 1570 (GBD)(SN); and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(jwh)
February 23, 2018 Filing 240 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Amend/Correct #239 MOTION to Correct Judgment . . Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 4/16/2018 (db).
February 15, 2018 Filing 239 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Correct Judgment . Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 4/16/2018 (db).
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER: On Wednesday, January 24, 2018, the Court held a telephone conference with the parties to discuss the remaining disputes regarding the deposition protocol. The Court has decided the disputed matters and has separately issued a Deposition Protocol Order. For the sake of clarity, the Court will briefly explain its decisions regarding the disputed matters. First, the Court determined that each side will be permitted to take 75 depositions. The plaintiffs proposed 100 depositions as a fair number. This number was based, in part, on the plaintiffs' Rule 26(a) Witness List and their deposition protocol proposal, which identified dozens of individuals from each of the five organizational defendants and six individual defendants that they intended to depose. In addition, plaintiffs reference a 2015 multidistrict litigation (involving products liability) that authorized 100 depositions for each side and included damages depositions (which this protocol does not). The plaintiffs state that they intend to depose current and former employees of the defendant organizations, former government officials and incarcerated al Qaeda members. Defendants, for their part, argue first for 50 depositions, but in the main argue for parity, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/31/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap) Modified on 2/1/2018 (ap). Modified on 2/2/2018 (ap).
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 DEPOSITION PROTOCOL ORDER: The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") established In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, 03 MDL 1570, and began transferring cases related to the 9/11 terrorist attacks from various judicial districts to this Court ("the MDL Court") for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. In addition to cases transferred into the MDL by the JPML, other cases related to the 9/11 terrorist attacks have been consolidated with this multidistrict proceeding (collectively, "MDL Proceeding"). A fundamental purpose of multidistrict litigation under 28 U.S.C. 1407 is to facilitate the conduct of efficient and non-duplicative discovery relating to questions of fact common to transferred and coordinated actions. The Parties have expressed an intention to conduct deposition discovery in the MDL Proceeding. Although several prior orders (see, e.g., ECF Nos. 247, 248, 1547, and 1900) contain provisions relating to depositions in the MDL Proceeding, the Court directed the Parties to meet and confer (see ECF No. 3541) to develop more specific protocols, and as further set forth in this order. (Deposition due by 1/31/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/31/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap)
January 25, 2018 Filing 235 OBJECTION to (599 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 3808 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
January 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 1/18/2018 re: (3667 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, (3702 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss /Al Rajhi Bank's Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. filed by Al Rajhi Bank, (3670 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina, (3691 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by National Commercial Bank, (3700 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Saudi Binladin Group. Plaintiff Counsel: Stephen A. Cozen, Sean P. Carter, J. Scott Tarbutton, Jodi W. Flowers, Robert T. Haefele, Jerry S. Goldman, Bruce E. Strong, Kanishka Agarwala, Robert Horkovich, John M. Quinn, James P. Kreindler, Andrew Joseph Maloney, III, Steven R. Pounian, Justin T. Green, Megan W. BenettDefense Counsel: Michael K. Kellogg, Benjamin D. Margo, Gregory G. Rapawy, Lawrence S. Robbins, Roy T. Englert, Jr., Lukman Aleez, Christopher M. Curran, Nicole Erb, Reuben J. Sequeira, Nicolle Kownacki, Mitchell R. Berger, Alan T. Dickey, Alexandra E. Chopin, James E. Gauch, Mark Kubisch, Esha Mankodi and Court Reporter present. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Vega, Elizabeth)
January 16, 2018 Transmission of Certified Copy of Updated Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #231 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER: granting #234 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/05/2018) (ama)
January 4, 2018 Filing 234 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Objections addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robert M. Kaplan dated January 4, 2018. Document filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Comapny, Continental Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transcontinental Insurance Company, Transportation Insurance Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled for Wednesday, January 24, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to provide a call-in for the Court and all parties. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees and the Defendants' Executive Committee should each select one representative to speak on their behalf. The parties should be prepared to discuss several issues regarding the proposed deposition protocol. First, paragraph 7 of the proposed deposition protocol contemplates that merits and jurisdictional discovery will be completed within the same timeframe. The parties should be prepared to discuss whether depositions relating to jurisdictional discovery should conclude sooner than depositions relating to merits discovery. The parties should also be prepared to discuss a plan for taking depositions relating to the merits of the claims against the defendants who are currently in jurisdictional discovery in the event that those claims are not dismissed on jurisdictional grounds. Second, the parties should be prepared to discuss the number of fact depositions per side and whether the two sides should be allowed to take the same number of depositions (Paragraph 35). Furthermore, the parties should be prepared to discuss the reasoning behind the numbers they have proposed, including the specific witnesses they wish to depose and why they believe depositions of those witnesses are critical. At this time, the Court is inclined to permit 75 depositions for the plaintiffs; it is unclear whether a similar number for the defendants is necessary. Third, the parties should be prepared to discuss which depositions should be counted toward any imposed limit (Paragraph 38). At this time, the Court is inclined not to count de bene esse depositions but to count any discovery deposition of a witness whose testimony is subsequently taken for trial preservation. In addition, the defendants' proposal with respect to this paragraph refers to a party noticing "the deposition of its own witness." The defendants should be prepared to explain what this phrase means and how it is distinguishable from depositions to perpetuate testimony for trial. (Telephone Conference set for 1/24/2018 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/2/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap)
January 2, 2018 USCA Case Number 17-4035 from the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit assigned to (231 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 3838 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Notice of Appeal, filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(nd)
December 29, 2017 Appeal Fee Payment: for (231 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) Notice of Appeal,. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-14526809. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
December 28, 2017 Filing 232 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (3845 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Status Report filed by Wael Jalaidan. ENDORSEMENT: The Court deems this status report to be sufficient. Counsel is directed to continue his efforts to communicate directly and proactively with OFAC to pursue the approval of the necessary license. In light of the holiday schedule, the next status report shall be due on February 4, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/28/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ap)
December 18, 2017 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (231 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 3838 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Notice of Appeal, filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(nd)
December 18, 2017 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (3838 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 231 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) Notice of Appeal,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(nd)
December 15, 2017 Appeal Fee Due: for (3838 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 231 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) Notice of Appeal,. $505.00 Appeal fee due by 12/29/2017. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(nd)
December 15, 2017 Filing 231 NOTICE OF APPEAL from (217 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 3633 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,,, (228 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,,. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
November 22, 2017 Filing 230 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 11/22/2017 re: Adjourn Oral Argument as to Saudi Binladin Group, Al Rajhi Bank, and National Commercial Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
November 21, 2017 Filing 229 DECLARATION of Lawrence Boysen in Support re: (3628 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Islamic Republic of Iran.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER adopting (219 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 3676 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) Motion for Judgment, filed by all plaintiffs: For the reasons set forth below, this Court overrules Plaintiffs' objections and adopts Magistrate Judge Netburn's Report and Recommendation. The non-immediate family member Plaintiffs' solatium damages claims are DENIED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/17/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(jwh)
November 16, 2017 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for two copies of the A nOtice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment (MDL Doc. No. 3017) Entered by the Honorable George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015, Partial Order and Judgment(MDL Doc. No. 3382), entered by the Honorable George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 and Memorandum Decision and Order (MDL Doc. No. 3383), entered by the Honorable George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016, and Memorandum Decision and Order (MDL Doc. No. 3384), entered by the Honorable George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016., Cover Letter to the Foreign Minister of Iran, Affidavit of the Translator mailed to Policy Review & Inter-Agency Liason ( The Honorable Mohammad Javad Zarif )on 11/7/2016 by Federal Express tracking # 7776 4626 8916, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 11/07/2016 by Federal Express tracking # 777646268916, as per #183 Clerk Certificate of Mailing,,,, RECEIVED ON: 11/08/2016. (smc)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER: terminating 3486 (in case 3md1570) Motion for Attorney Fees; terminating 3727 (in case 3md1570) Letter Motion for Conference. As discussed at the conference held on October 5, 2017, the following deadlines have been modified. Defendant World Assembly of Muslim Youth's ("WAMY's") document production shall be completed by November 30, 2017. Because WAMY has been given substantial time to produce documents, no further extensions of this deadline will be granted. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees ("PECs") shall file a status letter discussing WAMY's document production and whether it intends to file any discovery motions by January 5, 2018. The PECs shall file any discovery motion against Defendant Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi no later than December 1, 2017, by motion not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. Defendant Kadi shall oppose such motion no later than January 5, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. The PECs may file a reply no later than January 26, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 10 double-spaced pages. The PECs shall file any discovery motion against Defendants Muslim World League ("MWL") and International Islamic Relief Organization ("IIRO") no later than December 1, 2017, by motion not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. Defendants MWL and IIRO shall oppose such discovery motion no later than January 5, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. The PECs may file a reply no later than January 26, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 10 double-spaced pages. All other deadlines remain in effect. In addition, in light of Defendant Perouz Sedaghaty's ongoing bankruptcy proceedings, Plaintiffs' application for attorney fees and expenses, ECF No. 3486, is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3486 and 3727. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/12/2017) (ap) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER: The Court previously scheduled a telephone conference for 4:00 p.m. on October 5, 2017, to address certain deadlines. During the conference, the Court will also address the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' request to extend the deadlines to submit motions to compel or motions for sanctions against Defendants Muslim World League and the International Islamic Relief Organization. ECF No. 3737. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees are directed to circulate a call-in number to all interested parties and to provide that number to the Court in advance of the telephone conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/3/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(rj)
September 29, 2017 Filing 225 OBJECTION to (219 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 3676 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations "Hoglan IV" Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
August 31, 2017 Filing 224 STATUS REPORT. Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' Status Report in accordance with the Court's July 28, 2017 Order Document filed by All Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
August 28, 2017 Filing 223 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert T. Haefele on behalf of the PECs dated August 28, 2017 re: Disputes regarding proposed deposition protocol for the MDL. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (3690 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, (220 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; 30 in case 16cv7853; 47 in case 16cv9663; 46 in case 16cv9937; 46 in 17cv117; 46 in case 17cv450; 36 in case 17cv2651; 9 in case 17cv6123; 23 in case 17cv3887; 39 in case 17cv3908) Letter filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (3690 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 220 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) Letter. (Objections to R&R due by 9/29/2017) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/22/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(ama) Modified on 9/26/2017 (ap).
August 22, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (368 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 33 in 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN, 101 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN, 47 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN, 494 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 466 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 15 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD, 46 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 418 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 29 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN, 221 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 768 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 449 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 556 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 565 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 39 in 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN, 981 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 9 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD, 372 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 29 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN, 576 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 844 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 455 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 338 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 541 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 46 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 362 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 23 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN, 624 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 378 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN, 66 in 1:16-cv-07853-GBD, 26 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN, 36 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 3698 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 363 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 21 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD, 39 in 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN) MOTION for Matthew S. Leddicotte to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14038631. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (47 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 47 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 67 in 1:16-cv-07853-GBD, 47 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 37 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 24 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN, 40 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 3699 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 10 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD) MOTION for Reuben J. Sequeira to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14039333. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
August 21, 2017 Filing 221 MOTION for Matthew S. Leddicotte to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14038631. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Al Rajhi Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Curran, Christopher)
August 18, 2017 Filing 220 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Timothy B. Fleming dated August 18, 2017 re: Extension of time to file Objections to Mag. J. Report and Recommendations in Hoglan IV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: re: (62 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) Amended Complaint, filed by Jason Diehl, Emma Fernandez Regan, Carolyn Sutton, Michelle Clendenney, Cirilo Fernandez, Leslie Coale Brown, Anthony Dorf, Kathryn Collman, Richard Fernandez, Karen Ventre, Geraldine Deborah Spaeter, Tina Grazioso, Steve Gengler, Joseph Carpeneto, Sandra Grazioso, D. Linden Hoglan, Candyce Sue Hoglan, Herbert Hoglan, Jeannette Coffey, Arline Peabody, all plaintiffs, Brenda Jobe, Susan Bohan, Jeannette Diehl, Loretta Haines, Lee N. Hoglan, Carole Grazioso, Vaughn V. Hoglan, Aleese M. Hartmann, Rachel G. Malubay, Stephen Bradish, Joanann Coale, Jane G. Haller, Hoglan Plaintiffs, Renee L. Gamboa, Vicki Lynn Michel, Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan, Maria Joule, Julie Bertelsen Hoglan, Krysty Grazioso, Colleen Mcdonald, Brian Major, Karen Bingham, Dian Dembinski, Alice Hoglan, Keith Bradkowski, Grace Parkinson-godshalk, Carolee Azzarello, Heather Strickland, Michael Chirchirillo, Nicholas Chirchirillo, Jack Bradish, Kelly Arthurs, Charles Edward Gengler, (3547 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Amended Complaint, filed by Managing Agency Partners Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Ltd. For the reasons stated above, the Court reaffirms the standards established in its October 14, 2016 Report and Recommendation and as further set forth herein, and recommends that the claims referenced in the current Report and Recommendation be DENIED, and as further set forth in this order. Objections to R&R due by 8/22/2017 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/8/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(ap)
August 7, 2017 Filing 218 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (366 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 554 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 539 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 840 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 492 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 574 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 766 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 370 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 622 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 376 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN, 3674 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 979 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 563 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD) Letter filed by Faisal Islamic Bank, Faisal Islamic Bank (Sudan), Faisal Islamic Bank-Sudan. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remove John Lauro, Michael Califano, and Hugh Higgins from the electronic service list in all cases included in this multidistrict litigation. Attorney Hugh D Higgins and John F. Lauro terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/7/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ap)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER for (3374 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations: In her Report, Magistrate Judge Netburn advised the parties that failure to file timely objections to the Report would constitute a waiver of those objections on appeal. (Id. at 15); see also 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b). Plaintiffs filed timely objections to the Report (Pl. Obj. to Report ("Pl. Obj."), ECF Nos. 3416, 3417) and Defendants did not respond. Having reviewed Magistrate Judge Netburn's Report and Recommendation, this Court overrules Plaintiffs' objection and adopts the Report in full. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/20/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(jwh)
May 25, 2017 Filing 216 MOTION to Withdraw (3566 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Declaration in Support of Motion . Document filed by Carole Grazioso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 9, 2017 Filing 215 DECLARATION of Norma Ward in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 9, 2017 Filing 214 DECLARATION of Candyce Hoglan in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 6, 2017 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [DECLARATION of Carole Grazioso in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment] from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to doc. # 3617 in case number 03md1570, Order on Motion to Withdraw. (tn)
May 6, 2017 Filing 213 DECLARATION of Norma Ward in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 6, 2017 Filing 212 DECLARATION of Judith Reiss for Estate of Ken Jackson in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 6, 2017 Filing 211 DECLARATION of Judith Reiss for Estate of Lenore Jackson in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 6, 2017 Filing 210 DECLARATION of Gary Reiss for Estate of Ida Reiss in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 6, 2017 Filing 209 DECLARATION of Lee N. Hoglan in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 6, 2017 Filing 207 DECLARATION of Candyce Hoglan in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 6, 2017 Filing 206 DECLARATION of Kathleen B. Hoglan in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 6, 2017 Filing 205 DECLARATION of Vaughn Hoglan in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 204 DECLARATION of Linden Hoglan in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 203 DECLARATION of Estate of Herbert Hoglan in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 202 DECLARATION of Alice Hoagland in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 201 DECLARATION of Jennie Mandelino in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 200 DECLARATION of Maryann Mistrulli Rosser in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 199 DECLARATION of Philomena Mistrulli in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 198 DECLARATION of Angela Mistrulli in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 197 DECLARATION of Mary Ann Pino in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 196 DECLARATION of James Mandelino in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 195 DECLARATION of Jennie Mandelino in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 194 DECLARATION of Anthony Dorf in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
May 5, 2017 Filing 193 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment . Reconsideration of Claims of Functional Equivalents of Immediate Family Members. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
April 28, 2017 Filing 192 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated April 28, 2017 re: Revised Notice to Conform and Short Form Complaint. Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Conform, #2 Exhibit B - Revised Proposed Short Form Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
April 21, 2017 Filing 191 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated April 21, 2017 re: (3524 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Steven T. Cottreau dated April 20, 2017. . Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
April 20, 2017 Filing 190 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated April 20, 2017 re: Response to Michael K. Kellogg's April 17, 2017 Letter on the PECs' Proposed Short Form Complaint. Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
April 11, 2017 Filing 189 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 4/11/2017 re: Request to file amended proposals of short form complaints. Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
March 23, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Status Conference held on 3/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(jnm)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER: On October 14, 2016, I issued a Report and Recommendation in Hoglan v. Islamic Republic of Iran, 11-CV-7750 (GBD)(SN), recommending that final judgments for solatium damages be entered for 13 non-immediate family members of 9/11 decedents and denied for all other claimants. ECF No. 3363. On October 31, 2016, the Hoglan plaintiffs submitted objections to my findings that the claimants not awarded damages did not meet the legal standard to be considered "functional equivalents" of immediate family members. ECF No. 3381. In light of other plaintiffs' representations at an October 20, 2016 status conference that they were interested in briefing the issues of non-immediate family members' entitlement to solatium damages, the Hoglan plaintiffs asked that the issue be recommitted to me for further briefing. Id. On the same day, Judge Daniels adopted the Report in its entirety as to the 13 plaintiffs awarded damages, and deferred judgment as to all others until "all parties subject to the Scheduling Order have presented their motions and fully briefed the issue of non-immediate family members' entitlement to solatium damage awards, and Magistrate Judge Netbum has presented any further Report and Recommendations which such motions require." ECF No. 3384. Pursuant to my October 20, 2016 Scheduling Order, such briefing was to occur by January 13, 2017. ECF No. 3369 ("By [January 13, 2017], the Ashton and Bauer plaintiffs may file a motion for compensatory damages of non-immediate family members and may address the question of the appropriate prejudgment interest.") On January 10, 2017, however, the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee requested an adjournment of the scheduled briefing on punitive damages, given that the Victims of State-Sponsored Terrorism ("VSST") Fund was not awarding such damages. ECF No. 3419. On that same day, the Court granted the request, and adjourned the briefing sine die. ECF No. 3420. Neither the plaintiffs' letter nor the Court's Order, however, addressed the briefing on the non-immediate family member issue. the Court orders the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee to submit a status letter by Friday, March 10, 2017. This letter should state: (a) whether the Plaintiffs are interested in making a submission on this issue; (b) whether any such submission shall be a joint submission and if separate submissions are to be made, the necessity for such submissions; and (c) a proposed date for this submission, which is to be no later than May 5, 2017. The Hoglan plaintiffs will be permitted, though not required, to make an additional submission in support of the non-immediate family member plaintiffs not recommended damages by the same date. The Court will also fully consider their October 31, 2016 Objections in its analysis. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/3/2017) (anc)
January 7, 2017 Filing 187 OBJECTION to (3374 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations (Supplement) Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
January 6, 2017 Filing 186 OBJECTION to (3374 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations as to Shefi and Rowe families Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OBJECTIONS. The Court has received Plaintiffs' motion requesting a second extension of time to file objections to the Magistrate Judge's denial of the claims of the Estates of Hagay Shefi and Nicholas Rowe, and the nine solatium damages claims made by non-citizen immediate family members derived from Shefi and Rowe's deaths on September 11, 2001, until January 6, 2017, or such other time as the Court deems appropriate. The Plaintiffs having stated adequate grounds for this request, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that said Plaintiffs shall file their Objections by January 6, 2017. So ordered. Filed in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; Granting (184) SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections for Shefi and Rowe Estates and Families addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Timothy B. Fleming dated December 15, 2016. Document filed by all plaintiffs in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/19/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN (rjm)
December 15, 2016 Filing 184 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections for Shefi and Rowe Estates and Families addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Timothy B. Fleming dated December 15, 2016. Document filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Timothy)
November 9, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Objections to R&R due by 12/16/2016 Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(cf)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting (3390) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation regarding Claims of Shefi and Rowe Families in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (181) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation regarding Claims of Shefi and Rowe Families in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN. The Court has received Plaintiffs' motion requesting an extension of time to file objections to the Magistrate Judge's denial of the claims of the Estates of Hagay Shefi and Nicholas Rowe, and the nine solatium damages claims made by non-citizen immediate family members derived from Shefi and Rowe's deaths on September 11, 2001, until December 16, 2016 or such other time as the Court deems appropriate. The Plaintiffs having stated adequate grounds for this request, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that said Plaintiffs shall file their Objections by December 16, 2016. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/9/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN (cf)
November 7, 2016 Filing 183 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the A nOtice of Default Judgment prepared in accordance with 22 CFR 93.2, Order of Judgment (MDL Doc. No. 3017) Entered by the Honorable George B. Daniels on August 31, 2015, Partial Order and Judgment(MDL Doc. No. 3382), entered by the Honorable George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016 and Memorandum Decision and Order (MDL Doc. No. 3383), entered by the Honorable George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016, and Memorandum Decision and Order (MDL Doc. No. 3384), entered by the Honorable George B. Daniels on October 31, 2016., Cover Letter to the Foreign Minister of Iran, Affidavit of the Translator mailed to Policy Review & Inter-Agency Liason ( The Honorable Mohammad Javad Zarif )on 11/7/2016 by Federal Express tracking # 7776 4626 8916, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
November 3, 2016 Filing 181 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation regarding Claims of Shefi and Rowe Families addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Timothy B. Fleming dated 11/03/2016. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER. AND NOW, having considered Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed Directly to Diplomatic Service Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), which is unopposed, and the accompanying Memorandum of Law and Exhibits, and all the record in this case, Plaintiffs" Motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs may proceed directly to diplomatic service. under 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), of the partial final judgment in this case upon the Islamic Republic of Iran and any and all of the Iranian Defendants. So ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/31/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN (rjm)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 PARTIAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. ORDERED that Defendants are jointly and severally liable for the entire award; ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for punitive damages is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and as further specified and set forth in this Partial Order and Judgment. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall forthwith serve a copy of this Partial Order and Judgment to Defendants. This is a final, appealable order. See Fed. R. App. P. (4)(a). Motions terminated: (174 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 3376 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Serve Directly By Diplomatic Service filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/31/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN (rjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2016: #1 Right to Appeal Form #1, #2 Right to Appeal #2) (rjm). Modified on 11/28/2016 (rjm).
October 31, 2016 Filing 177 OBJECTION to (172 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 3363 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
October 28, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Fleming, Timothy to RE-FILE Document (3379 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 176 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court,. Use the event type Objection to Report and Recommendations found under the event list Other Answers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(nd)
October 28, 2016 Filing 176 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court from (172 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 3363 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations,,,,,. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nd).
October 27, 2016 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (174 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN) MOTION to Serve Directly By Diplomatic Service. . Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
October 27, 2016 Filing 174 MOTION to Serve Directly By Diplomatic Service. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rubin case, #2 Exhibit Continental Casualty service exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
October 26, 2016 Filing 173 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Timothy B. Fleming dated October 26, 2016 re: Awards recommended by Magistrate Judge Netburn. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Awards per Reports and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Partial Final Order and Judgment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(Fleming, Timothy)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, I recommend that solatium damages be GRANTED to plaintiffs Lea Bitterman, Sean Bitterman, the Estate of Marion Thomas, Keith Bradkowski, Kathryn Collman, Charles Gengler, Susan Bohan, Steven Gengler, Arlene Peabody-Bane, Brian Major, Brenda E. Jobe, Colleen McDonald, and Aleese M. Hartmann in the amounts set forth above. I recommend that all other non-immediate-family member plaintiffs' claims be DENIED because they have not proven that they were functional equivalents of immediate family members. The portions of the compensatory damages which are awarded for solatium should be subject to interest at the rate of 4.96 per annum, compounded annually, through the date that judgment is entered. I further recommend that plaintiffs' claims for punitive damages be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to a future application. In order to expedite the issuance of partial final judgment in this case, plaintiffs are instructed to submit to Judge Daniels an exhibit containing information regarding every plaintiff to whom I recommend damages be awarded. This exhibit should omit any reference to the plaintiffs whose claims I recommend be denied. (As further set forth in this Order.) Objections to R&R due by 10/31/2016 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/14/2016) (tro)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, I recommend that solatium damages be GRANTED to plaintiffs Lea Bitterman, Sean Bitterman, the Estate of Marion Thomas, Keith Bradkowski, Kathryn Collman, Charles Gengler, Susan Bohan, Steven Gengler, Arlene Peabody-Bane, Brian Major, Brenda E. Jobe, Colleen McDonald, and Aleese M. Hartmann in the amounts set forth above. I recommend that all other non-immediate-family member plaintiffs' claims be DENIED because they have not proven that they were functional equivalents of immediate family members. The portions of the compensatory damages which are awarded for solatium should be subject to interest at the rate of 4.96 per annum, compounded annually, through the date that judgment is entered. I further recommend that plaintiffs' claims for punitive damages be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to a future application. In order to expedite the issuance of partial final judgment in this case, plaintiffs are instructed to submit to Judge Daniels an exhibit containing information regarding every plaintiff to whom I recommend damages be awarded. This exhibit should omit any reference to the plaintiffs whose claims I recommend be denied. (As further set forth in this Order.) Objections to R&R due by 10/31/2016. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(kko)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons set forth above, I recommend that the Hoglan Plaintiffs described in this Report be awarded a default judgment against Iran in the amount of $1,759,715,035. The portions of the compensatory damages which are awarded for pain and suffering and solatium are also subject to interest at the rate of 4.96 per annum, compounded annually, through the date that judgment is entered. I further recommend that plaintiffs' claims for punitive damages be denied without prejudice to a future application. The solatium claims of 79 Individual Plaintiffs who are non-immediate family members of 9/11 decedents, the economic damages and pain and suffering claims of the two Estate Plaintiffs representing decedents who were not U.S. nationals at the time of their deaths, and the solatium claims of non-U.S. national immediate family members of non-U.S. national decedents shall all be addressed in a forthcoming Report and Recommendation. In order to expedite the issuance of partial final judgment in this case, plaintiffs are instructed to submit to Judge Daniels an exhibit containing information regarding every Estate and Individual Plaintiff to whom I recommend damages be awarded. This exhibit should have the name of each plaintiff, compensatory damages broken down between economic damages, pain and suffering, and solatium, and total damage award per plaintiff. The exhibit should omit any reference to the 88 Individual Plaintiffs and the two Estate Plaintiffs who are not covered by this Report and Recommendation. (As further set forth in this Report and Recommendation.) Objections to R&R due by 10/31/2016 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/12/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN(kko) (Main Document 3358 replaced on 10/12/2016) (kko). Modified on 10/12/2016 (kko).
October 4, 2016 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Magistrate Judge Frank Maas no longer referred to the case. (sjo)
October 4, 2016 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (sjo)
September 30, 2016 Filing 170 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (169 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM) Letter filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs re: Report and Recommendation on Damages. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is aware of the time constraints on this matter in light of the Victims of State-Sponsored Terrorism Fund's deadlines and is acting expeditiously to resolve the damages inquest. At this time, the Court does not believe that a status conference is necessary. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/30/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(kko)
September 29, 2016 Filing 169 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Timothy B. Fleming dated September 29, 2016 re: Report and Recommendation on Damages. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.(Fleming, Timothy)
September 28, 2016 Filing 168 REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against Islamic Republic of Iran . Document filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transcontinental Insurance Company, Transportation Insurance Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting declaration, #2 Exhibit Declaration of service, #3 Exhibit Clerk's certificate)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
September 26, 2016 Filing 167 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #166 Letter filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: I will be leaving the bench on 9/29/16. This MDL case will be shortly transferred to Magistrate Judge Netburn, who already has the files. She and her staff are well aware of the urgency of your motion and are taking steps to deal with it as soon as they can. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/26/2016) (cf)
September 22, 2016 Filing 166 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Timothy B. Fleming dated September 22, 2016 re: Report and Recommendation on Damages and VSST Fund. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.(Fleming, Timothy)
August 4, 2016 Filing 165 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Timothy B. Fleming dated 08/04/2016 re: U.S. Victims of State Sponsored Terrorism Fund. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42 U.S.C. Sec. 10609, #2 Exhibit Federal Register regulations July 14, 2016)(Fleming, Timothy)
July 15, 2016 Filing 164 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Timothy B. Fleming dated 7/13/2016 re: We request Your Honor accept this letter as Plaintiffs' request to seal one additional document in the above-captioned matter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(ama)
July 8, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas: Discovery Conference held on 7/8/2016. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(mo)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (3190 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 153 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM) MOTION Admit Certain Evidence From A Related Case re: (112 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 3023 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Judgment Hoglan, et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, et al.. filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. AND NOW, upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Admit into Evidence Certain Materials Supporting Damages from Havlish, et al. v. bin Laden, et al., which is unopposed, it is hereby ORDERED and DECREED that Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. The expert report and curriculum vitae of Alberto Diaz, Jr., M.D., RADM MC US N(Ret.), as well as the Declarations as listed in 10 of Plaintiffs' Motion, are hereby entered into evidence for the damages portion of Hoglan, et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, et al. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 4/6/2016) (cf)
March 31, 2016 Filing 161 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas: Oral Argument held on 3/22/2016 re: (94 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM) Letter,,,,, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees, (95 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM) Letter,, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(mo)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Timothy B. Fleming dated 3/21/2016 re: Plaintiff's request to file a CD-ROM and supporting documents for "Exhibit C" under seal. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 3/21/2016) (cf)
February 5, 2016 Filing 159 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Christopher C. S. Manning, Esquire dated February 5, 2016 re: Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Document filed by Sanabel Al Kheer, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Manning, Christopher)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER. The conference scheduled for January 28, 2016 is adjourned until July 14, 2016 at 10:30 AM. (Status Conference set for 7/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/25/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. (adc)
January 21, 2016 Filing 157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order Dated January 13, 2016 served on Angela LeGrand on 1/13/2016. Service was made by Mail (First Class and Certified). Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting (3165) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. AND NOW, this 13th day of January, 2016, upon consideration of the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Angela LeGrand, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Counsel's Motion is GRANTED and all counsel for Plaintiff Angela LeGrand are hereby granted leave to withdraw their appearance as counsel for Angela LeGrand; on condition that counsel serve copies of this Order upon Ms. LeGrand by regular and certified U.S Mail by January 18, 2016, and file proof of service by January 25, 2016. 2. Within thirty (30) days of the date of said mailing, Angela LeGrand shall file a status report with the court indicating whether she has retained new counsel or whether she intends to proceed pro se. 3. If Angela LeGrand fails to file a status report within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the Court may enter an Order dismissing her claim with prejudice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 1/13/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM (cf)
January 11, 2016 Filing 155 STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, PART ONE, #2 Exhibit A, PART TWO, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, PART ONE, #6 Exhibit D, PART TWO, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, PART ONE, #10 Exhibit G, PART TWO, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, PART ONE, #15 Exhibit K, PART TWO)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Fleming, Timothy)
January 11, 2016 Filing 154 OBJECTION to (3175 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Report and Recommendations regarding awards to certain Ashton plaintiffs Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Fleming, Timothy)
December 31, 2015 Filing 153 MOTION Admit Certain Evidence From A Related Case re: (112 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 3023 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Judgment,,,, Hoglan, et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, et al.. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 30, 2015 Filing 152 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (3144) Suggestion of Death and Motion to Substitute Plaintiff in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM (cdo)
December 14, 2015 Filing 150 SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Pedro Gerardino on August 18, 2014 . Document filed by Hoglan PlaintiffsFiled In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 14, 2015 Filing 149 MOTION for Stephen A. Corr on behalf of all Plaintiffs' Counsel to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Angela LeGrand. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER: The subsequent conference scheduled for January 14, 2016 is rescheduled for January 28, 2016 at 10:30 AM. (Status Conference set for 1/28/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/10/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(kl)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #134 Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Anthony Borzumato added. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/9/2015) (spo)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #135 Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Michael Edward Paige added. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/9/2015) (spo)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #137 Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. John Haller added. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/9/2015) (spo)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #133 Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Audrey Model added. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/9/2015) (spo)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #132 Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Audrey Model added. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/9/2015) (spo)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #131 Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Gary Reiss added. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/9/2015) (spo)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #129 Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Patricia Caloia added. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/9/2015) (spo)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #128 Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Kathryn Halvorson added. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/9/2015) (spo) Modified on 12/9/2015 (spo).
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #127 Motion to Substitute Party. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Herbert Hoglan (is a surviving Grandfather of Mark Kendall Bingham) terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/9/2015) (spo)
December 8, 2015 Filing 137 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: James Bond Godshalk, New Party: John Haller, Executor of the Estate of James Bond Godshalk, deceased With Suggestion of Death. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 7, 2015 Filing 136 SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Gail Smith on August 28, 2013 . Document filed by Hoglan PlaintiffsFiled In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 7, 2015 Filing 135 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Susanne Ward-Baker, New Party: Michael Edward Paige, Personal Representative of the Estate of Susanne Ward-Baker, deceased With Suggestion of Death. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 7, 2015 Filing 134 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Louise Borzumato, New Party: Anthony Borzumato, Executor of the Estate of Louise Borzumato, deceased With Suggestion of Death. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 7, 2015 Filing 133 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Florence Rosenthal, New Party: Audrey Model, Next-of-Kin and Successor to the Estate of Florence Rosenthal, deceased With Suggestion of Death. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 7, 2015 Filing 132 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Leonard Rosenthal, New Party: Audrey Model, Executrix of the Estate of Leonard Rosenthal, deceased With Suggestion of Death. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 7, 2015 Filing 131 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Ida Reiss, New Party: Gary Reiss, Executor of the Estate of Ida Reiss, deceased With Suggestion of Death. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 7, 2015 Filing 130 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: James Lostrangio, New Party: Diane Lostrangio, Executrix of the Estate of James Lostrangio, deceased With Suggestion of Death. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 7, 2015 Filing 129 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Emily Lavelle, New Party: Patricia Caloia, Executor of the Estate of Emily Lavelle, deceased With Suggestion of Death. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 7, 2015 Filing 128 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Evelyn Halvorson, New Party: Kathryn Halvorson, Executrix of the Estate of Evelyn Halvorson, deceased With Suggestion of Death. Document filed by all plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
December 7, 2015 Filing 127 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Herbert Hoglan, New Party: Alice A. Hoagland, Executrix of the Estate of Herbert Hoglan, deceased With Suggestion of Death. Document filed by Herbert Hoglan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen)
November 9, 2015 Filing 148 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Thomas P. Steindler dated 11/4/2015 re: I respectfully request that I be removed from the docket list for the above matter, as my firm no longer represents Mr. Yassin Kadi. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., Attorney Thomas Peter Steindler terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 11/6/2015) (lmb)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Timothy B. Fleming dated 11/6/2015 re: We request Your Honor accept this letter as Plaintiffs' request to seal Exhibit H to the Inquest Memorandum which is a CD-ROM containing personal financial and economic data for each of the named Plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 11/9/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(lmb)
October 30, 2015 Filing 125 CLERK'S RULE 54(b)JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated October 30, 2015, there is no just reason for delay pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), dismissing defendants Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina (SHC); the dismissals of defendants Saudi Arabia and SHC are certified as final pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 10/30/2015) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal, #2 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(dt)
October 30, 2015 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (336 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 446 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-FM, 124 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 338 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 324 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 442 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 607 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 527 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 3096 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 771 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 358 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 938 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-FM, 430 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 364 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 479 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 390 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 354 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 541 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 502 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 526 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 724 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 88 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM) Order, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(mro)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: After careful consideration of the joint request for entry of final judgment, this Court finds that there is no just reason to delay the entry of a final judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) dismissing defendants Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina ("SHC"). A partial judgment under Rule 54(b) with respect to defendants Saudi Arabia and SHC is appropriate because both are immune from suit under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq. The Court has dismissed all claims asserted by any plaintiff against defendants Saudi Arabia as a foreign sovereign and SHC as an instrumentality of that foreign sovereign and has decided finally their rights and liabilities, constituting a final decision within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1291 as to those defendants. See ECF No. 3046. ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's dismissals of defendants Saudi Arabia and SHC are certified as final pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare and enter a final judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al, as per Chambers.(mro)
October 29, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Kreindler, James to RE-FILE Document No. #123 belonging to case 03md1570 and 02cv6977 that was incorrectly filed on 10/29/2015 in case 11cv7550. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the appeal was filed in the wrong case.. (nd)
October 29, 2015 Filing 123 FILING ERROR - FILED IN WRONG CASES - NOTICE OF APPEAL from (3046 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kreindler, James) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nd).
October 13, 2015 Filing 122 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (85 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM, 321 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 934 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-FM, 522 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 439 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 719 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 425 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 3066 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 361 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 604 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 476 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 522 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 332 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 121 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 441 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-FM, 538 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 351 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 334 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 498 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 385 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 355 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 766 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM) Letter filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., ( Motions due by 2/26/2016., Replies due by 12/4/2015.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 10/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(lmb)
October 13, 2015 Filing 121 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. dated 10/13/2015 re: Extension of time.. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #119 Motion for Stephen A. Corr to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/8/2015) (spo)
October 6, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #119 MOTION for Stephen A. Corr to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11474055. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
October 6, 2015 Filing 119 MOTION for Stephen A. Corr to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11474055. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Corr, Stephen)
September 21, 2015 Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT in Support re: (3042 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 117 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM) MOTION for Default Judgment as to .. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
September 21, 2015 Filing 117 MOTION for Default Judgment as to . Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
September 21, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document (473 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 762 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 328 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 930 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-FM, 494 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 715 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 3040 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 348 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 318 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 82 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM, 381 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 518 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 352 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 436 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 438 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-FM, 518 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 601 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 116 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 330 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 420 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 535 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 358 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM) MOTION for Default Judgment as to .. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(db)
September 18, 2015 Filing 116 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Default Judgment as to . Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 9/21/2015 (db).
September 18, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. (115 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 3039 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION for Stephen A. Corr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Pennsylvania;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(bcu)
September 18, 2015 Filing 115 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Stephen A. Corr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM(Corr, Stephen) Modified on 9/18/2015 (bcu).
September 15, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert Turner Haefele to RE-FILE Document (357 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 3033 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 493 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 351 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 714 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 81 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM, 472 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 761 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 435 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 380 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 929 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-FM, 419 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 437 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-FM, 329 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 517 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 317 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 114 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 600 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 534 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 347 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 327 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 517 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD) MOTION for Sanctions against Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc... Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(db)
September 14, 2015 Filing 114 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Sanctions against Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2015 (db).
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Inquest After Default/Damages Hearing. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/3/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-06978-GBD, 1:04-cv-01076-GBD, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(lmb)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER OF JUDGMENT: ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment by the Court against Sovereign Defendants, The Islamic Republic of Iran, Ayatolla Ali Hoseini-Khamenei, Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, Iranian Ministry of Information and Security, The Islamic Revolutionary Guards Corps, Hezbollah, The Iranian Ministry of Petroleum, The National Iranian Tanker Corporation, The National Iranian Oil Corporation, The National Iranian Gas Company, Iran Airlines, The National Iranian Petrochemical Company, Iranian Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, Iranian Ministry of Commerce, Iranian Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logics, and The Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran (collectively "Iranian Defendants") is GRANTED and final judgment on liability in entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against all Iranian Defendants; ORDERED that the Plaintiffs are hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas to resolve any remaining issues, including but not lmited to damages both compensatory and punitive. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/31/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(ama)
August 31, 2015 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 110 Order of Judgment. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ama)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 PLAINTIFFS' FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT: The above Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law are hereby entered as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/31/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(lmb)
August 27, 2015 Filing 109 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: Upon consideration of the evidence submitted by the Plaintiffs in filings with this Court and the evidence presented at the August 17, 2015 hearing on liability, together with the entire record in this case, it is hereby; ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to file evidence under seal is GRANTED; Plaintiffs may file their sealed evidence exclusively in CD-ROM form due to the volume of materials; and, Plaintiffs will manually file the sealed evidence with the Clerk. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/27/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(ama)
August 27, 2015 Filing 107 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Stephen A. Corr dated August 27, 2015 re: Respones to Court's Order dated August 25, 2015 with revised Order of Judgment. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Corr, Stephen)
August 26, 2015 Filing 106 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit 13A in Support of Judgment by Default re: (91 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD) MOTION for Judgment .. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Corr, Stephen)
August 26, 2015 Filing 105 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jerry S. Goldman dated August 26, 2015 re: Revised Proposed Form Of Order For Entry Of Default Judgment Solely As To Liability Against The Iran Defendants. Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: The Hoglan, O'Neill, Federal Insurance Co., and Ashton Plaintiffs that have submitted proposed orders for default judgment shall submit revised proposed orders on or before August 28, 2015, which track the language and format of the Order of Judgment issued in Havlish, et al. v. bin Laden, et al.,1 :03-cv-09848 (GBD), such that all proposed orders are uniform but for any substantive differences (e.g., the individual defendants at issue). (See Havlish Order of Judgment, 03 MDL 1570, ECF No. 2516 (Dec. 22, 2011). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/25/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-06978-GBD, 1:04-cv-01076-GBD, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(ama)
August 17, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 8/17/2015 re: #91 MOTION for Judgment . filed by all plaintiffs. Plaintiff Counsel: Stephen A. Corr, Thomas E. Mellon, Jerry S. Goldman, Robert Foote, Timothy Fleming, Richard Hailey, Bruce Strong; Defense Counsel: N/A and court reporter present. The next conference is scheduled for January 14, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. (Vega, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2015 Filing 103 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jerry S. Goldman dated August 17, 2015 re: Requesting Extension of Default Judgment as to Liability Only, Obtained in this MDL against the Iran Defendants, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1605A, to the O'Neill Plaintiffs in the Case Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., et al. v. The Republic of Iraq, et al., 04-CV-1076 (GBD). Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) listed. Richard Hailey: 1 iPad, 1 lap top computer; Tom Mellon: 2 lap top computers; 2 hard drives, 1 phone; Tim Fleming: 1 hard drive, 1 phone, into the Courthouse for us in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned Hoglan, et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran et al., No. 11-cv-7550 on 8/17/2015. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/13/2015) (tro)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: that the following attorney: Stephen A. Corr is authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) listed: iPhone, iPad and lap top, into the Courthouse for us in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned Hoglan, et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran et al., No. 11-cv-7550 on 8/17/2015. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/13/2015) (tro) Modified on 8/13/2015 (tro).
August 11, 2015 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: (99 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Islamic Republic of Iran, The Iranian Ministry of Intelligence and Security, The Iranian Minister of Intelligence and Security Ali Fallahian, The Iranian Revolutionary Guard Corps, The Iranian Revolutionary Guard Co. Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 11, 2015 Filing 99 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Islamic Republic of Iran, The Iranian Ministry of Intelligence and Security, The Iranian Minister of Intelligence and Security Ali Fallahian, The Iranian Revolutionary Guard Corps, The Iranian Revolutionary Guard Corps -- Qods Force, Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei, and Deputy Commander Brigadier General of the Iranian Revolutionary Guard Corp. Mohammed Baqr Zalqadr . Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 11, 2015 Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. In Support in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Solely Against The Iran Defendants.. Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 11, 2015 Filing 97 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Solely Against The Iran Defendants. Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 10, 2015 Filing 96 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Robert T. Haefele dated August 10, 2015 re: Request that the Court enter an order pursuant to Rule 37(a) and (b) compelling defendant Perouz Sedaghaty to immediately produce all documents and information responsive to Plaintiffs' document requests. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
August 10, 2015 Filing 95 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Robert T. Haefele dated August 10, 2015 re: Request that the Court enter an order pursuant to Rule 37(a) compelling defendant Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe to immediately produce all documents and information responsive to Plaintiffs' document requests. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
August 10, 2015 Filing 94 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. dated 08/10/2015 re: Letter Brief No. 2, Request That The Court Enter An Order Pursuant To Rule 37(a) Compelling Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan To Immediately Produce All Documents And Information Responsive To Plaintiffs' Document Requests. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Supplement OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Exhibit RR, #45 Exhibit SS)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
July 30, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 7/30/2015 re: (2891 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION for Leave to File A Consolidated Amended Pleading of Facts and Evidence as to The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and The Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia and Herzegovina . filed by Burnett Plaintiffs, Kathleen Ashton, Federal Insurance Company, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., John Patrick O'Neill, Jr., Continental Casualty Company, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., (2893 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Saudi High Commission, The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Plaintiff Counsel: Sean P. Carter, Scott Tarbutton, Robert Haefele, James Kreindler, Jerry Goldman, Barbara Tirado, David C. Lee, Michel F. Baumeister; Defense Counsel: Michael K. Kellogg, Gregory G. Rapawy, Roy Englert, Steve Cottreau and court reporter present. The subsequent conference is scheduled for August 17, 2015 at 10:30a.m. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Vega, Elizabeth)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned: In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, No. 03-md-1570. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ama)
July 10, 2015 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #91 MOTION for Judgment . . Document filed by all plaintiffs. (Fleming, Timothy)
July 10, 2015 Filing 91 MOTION for Judgment . Document filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Timothy)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for April 9, 2015 is adjourned to July 30, 2015 at 11:00 AM. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 7/30/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/06/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ama)
March 17, 2015 Filing 89 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Islamic Republic of Iran; Ayatollah Ali Hosenei Khamenei, Supreme Leader of Iran; Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, Chairman, Expediency Discernment Counsel and former President of Iran; Ministry of Information and Security; Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps; Ministry of Petroleum; National Iranian Tanker Corporation; National Iranian Oil Corporation; National Iranian Gas Company; National Iranian Petrochemical Company; Iran Airlines; Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance; Ministry of Commerce; Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics; Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran; and Hezbollah. (km)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER EXTENDING TIME AND LENGTH LIMITS FOR REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND FOR LEAVE TO AMEND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the replies in support of the above motions each shall be filed no lather than March 27, 2015, and shall not exceed twenty pages in length. ( Replies due by 3/27/2015.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/11/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ama)
February 6, 2015 Filing 87 REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against Islamic Republic of Iran, Ayatollah Ali Hosenei Khamenei, Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, Iran's Ministry of Information and Security, Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, Iran's Ministry of Petroleum, National Iranian Tanker Corporation, National Iranian Oil Corporation, National Iranian Gas Company, National Iranian Petrochemical Company, Iran Airlines, Iran's Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, Iran's Ministry of Commerce, Iran's Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics, Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Hezbollah . Document filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Fleming, Timothy)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Andrew J. Maloney, III dated 2/03/2015 re: Accordingly, plaintiffs respectfully request the Court order the clerk's office to accept a CD Rom of the 4,000 pages to ensure that they are part of the publically filed record that both the Court and defense counsel now have. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/04/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ama)
January 28, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/3/2015 Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ajs)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting (402) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (695) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (2924) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; granting (413) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD; granting (362) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD; granting (580) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD; granting (519) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD; granting (498) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD; granting (475) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD; granting (311) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD; granting (457) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD; granting (302) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; granting (498) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD; granting (66) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM; granting (84) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD; granting (736) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM; granting (342) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM; granting (336) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD; granting (420) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD; granting (899) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD; granting (332) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD; granting (309) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD. Any opposition to the Renewed Motion to Dismiss of the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and Saudi High Commission for Bosnia & Herzegovina (SHC) is due on or before February 3, 2015. Any opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend is due on or before February 3, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. (ajs)
January 28, 2015 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kreindler, James)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting (395) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (678) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (2829) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; granting (398) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD; granting (345) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD; granting (560) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD; granting (509) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD; granting (484) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD; granting (464) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD; granting (299) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD; granting (449) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD; granting (295) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; granting (485) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD; granting (59) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM; granting (75) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD; granting (721) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM; granting (333) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM; granting (327) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD; granting (412) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD; granting (884) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD; granting (323) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD; granting (297) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD. In this Court's April 23, 2014 Order, this Court adopted Magistrate Judge Maas's report and recommendation that Plaintiffs' motion for an award of attorneys' fees, due to Plaintiffs' efforts to compel the Al Haramain Defendants and Defendant Jelaidan to comply with their discovery obligations, be granted. See 03-MDL-1570, ECF No. 2851. The Clerk of the Court is therefore instructed to close the motion in In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(FM), at ECF No. 2829, and the motion in Ashton et al. v. Al Qaeda Islamic, et al., 02-CV-6977 (GBD)(FM), at ECF No. 721. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/14/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. ***Docketed in all member cases pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro)
June 18, 2014 Filing 82 RESPONSE re: (2868 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Al Haramain as ECF Document No. 2868. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
June 6, 2014 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: (395 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 323 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 333 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 485 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 59 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM, 299 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 295 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 398 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD, 327 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 560 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 464 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 345 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 2829 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 484 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 412 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 75 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD, 509 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 721 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 449 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 884 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD, 297 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 678 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
June 6, 2014 Filing 80 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (395 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 323 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 333 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 485 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 59 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM, 299 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 295 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 398 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD, 327 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 560 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 464 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 345 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 2829 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 484 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 412 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 75 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD, 509 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 721 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 449 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 884 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD, 297 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 678 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013. Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Response to Al Haramain Filing at ECF No. 2864 and in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Attorney's Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
April 24, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 4/24/2014 re: (2773 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. filed by Abdul Rahman Al Swailem. Plaintiff Counsel: Sean Carter, Robert Turner Haefele, James P. Kreindler, Jerry Stephen Goldman, J. Scott Tarbutton; Defense Counsel: Alan Robert Kabat,, Omar T. Mohammedi, Roni Bargoffen, Aisha Henry, Peter C. Salerno, Amy Rothstein, Frederick J. Goetz, Thomas E. Mellon, Martin F. McMahon (telephonic) and Court Reporter present. The next conference is scheduled for July 15, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Vega, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2014 RETURN OF LETTERS ROGATORY re: embassy note number 22956 dated 2/5/2014, which was transmitted to the Swiss Ministry of Foreign Affairs on 2/6/2014 for further transmission to the American Interests Section of the Swiss Embassy in Tehran, Iran, as to Iranian Ministry of Defence and Armed Forces Logistics (Note No. 1008-IE), Islamic Republic of Iran (Note No. 1009-IE), Iranian Ministry of Information and Security (Note No. 1010-IE, Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps (Note No. 1011-IE), Iranian Ministry of Petroleum (Note 1012-IE), Iranian Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance (Note 1013-IE), Iranian Ministry of Commerce ( Note 1014-IE), Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran (Note 1015-IE). The section has received the above mentioned documents on 2/10/2014. It has transmitted theses to the Iranian Ministry of Foreign Affairs together with its diplomatic notes on 2/16/2014. The reception of the mentioned documents was refused the same day by the Iranian Ministry of Foreign Affairs.(tro)
April 1, 2014 Filing 78 RETURN OF LETTERS ROGATORY as to the Islamic Republic of Iran, the Iranian Ministry of Information and Security, the Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, the Iranian Ministry of Petroleum, the Iranian Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance, the Iranian Ministry of Commerce, the Iranian Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics, and the Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran dated and delivered on 2/16/14.(mro)
January 24, 2014 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: (75 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013.. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B1, #3 Exhibit B2, #4 Exhibit B3, #5 Exhibit B4, #6 Exhibit C1, #7 Exhibit C2, #8 Exhibit C3, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit O, #21 Exhibit P)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 24, 2014 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (75 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013.. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 24, 2014 Filing 75 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013. Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalfof themselves and all others similalrly situated).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: The conference initially scheduled for Thursday, January 16, 2014 is adjourned until Thursday, April 24, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 4/24/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ja)
December 13, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON 9/9/2011 (DOCKET NO. 42); COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED JULY 2, 2013; SUMMONSES; LETTERS ROGATORY; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FL., 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 (NATIONAL IRANIAN TANKER CORPORATION) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8127 2535, as per (2809 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/16/2013. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Kaliakina, Tatiana)
December 13, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON 9/9/2011 (DOCKET NO. 42); COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED 7/2/2013; SUMMONSES; LETTERS ROGATORY; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FL., 2201 NW, WASHIGTON, DC 20520 (HEZBOLLAH) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8130 4523, as per #79 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/16/2013. (Kaliakina, Tatiana)
December 13, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON 9/9/2011 (DOCKET NO. 42); COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED 7/2/2013; SUMMONSES; LETTERS ROGATORY; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CACSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FL. NW, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 (ALI AKBAR HASHEMI RAFSANJANI) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8128 5075, as per (2808 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/16/2013. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Kaliakina, Tatiana)
December 13, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON 9/9/2011 (DOCKET NO. 42); COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED 7/2/2013; SUMMONSES; LETTERS ROGATORY; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FL., 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 (NATIONAL IRANIAN PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8127 6276, as per (2812 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/16/2013. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Kaliakina, Tatiana)
December 13, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON 9/9/2011 (DOCKET NO. 42); COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED 7/2/2013; SUMMONSES; LETTERS ROGATORY; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FL., 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 (NATIONAL IRANIAN GAS CORPORATION) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8126 6996, as per (2811 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/16/2013. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Kaliakina, Tatiana)
December 13, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON 9/9/2011 (DOCKET NO. 42); COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED 7/2/2013; SUMMONSES; LETTERS ROGATORY; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FL., 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 (AYATOLLAH ALI HOSAINI KHAMENEI) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8128 8144, as per (2807 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/16/2014. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Kaliakina, Tatiana)
December 13, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON 9/9/2011 (DOCKET NO. 42); COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED 7/2/2013; SUMMONSES; LETTERS ROGATORY; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SER. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FL., 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 (NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL CORPORATION) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8123 5699, as per (2810 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/16/2013. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Kaliakina, Tatiana)
December 13, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON 9/9/2011 (DOCKET NO. 42); COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED 7/2/2013; SUMMONSES; LETTERS ROGATORY; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SER. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FL., 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 (IRANIAN AIRLINES) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8128 0213, as per (2813 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/16/2013. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Kaliakina, Tatiana)
December 13, 2013 Filing 79 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2011 (DOCKET NO. 42); COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED JULY 2, 2013; SUMMONSES; LETTERS ROGATORY; AND APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FL., 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 (HEZBOLLAH)on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8130 4523, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (Kaliakina, Tatiana)
December 13, 2013 Filing 73 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2, SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2011, COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED JULY 2, 2013, SUMMONSES, LETTERS ROGATORY, AND APPLICABLE FSIA TEX. DOCUMENTS IN BOTH ENGLISH AND FARSI FOR EACH EIGHT DEFENDANTS AS WELL AS AN AFFIDAVIT FROM THE TRANSLATOR mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC. 20520 mailed to Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 (Iranian Airline) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8128 0213, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
December 13, 2013 Filing 72 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2, SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2011, COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED JULY 2, 2013, SUMMONSES, LETTERS ROGATORY, AND APPLICABLE FSIA TEX. DOCUMENTS IN BOTH ENGLISH AND FARSI FOR EACH EIGHT DEFENDANTS AS WELL AS AN AFFIDAVIT FROM THE TRANSLATOR. mailed to Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, ( NATIONAL IRANIAN PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY)on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8127 6276, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
December 13, 2013 Filing 71 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2, SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2011, COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED JULY 2, 2013, SUMMONSES, LETTERS ROGATORY, AND APPLICABLE FSIA TEX. DOCUMENTS IN BOTH ENGLISH AND FARSI FOR EACH EIGHT DEFENDANTS AS WELL AS AN AFFIDAVIT FROM THE TRANSLATOR. mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC. 20520 ( NATIONAL IRANIAN GAS CORPORATION) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8126 6996, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
December 13, 2013 Filing 70 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2, SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2011, COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED JULY 2, 2013, SUMMONSES, LETTERS ROGATORY, AND APPLICABLE FSIA TEX. DOCUMENTS IN BOTH ENGLISH AND FARSI FOR EACH EIGHT DEFENDANTS AS WELL AS AN AFFIDAVIT FROM THE TRANSLATOR. mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC. 20520 mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC. 20520 (NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL CORPORATION) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8123 5699, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
December 13, 2013 Filing 69 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2, SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2011, COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED JULY 2, 2013, SUMMONSES, LETTERS ROGATORY, AND APPLICABLE FSIA TEX. DOCUMENTS IN BOTH ENGLISH AND FARSI FOR EACH EIGHT DEFENDANTS AS WELL AS AN AFFIDAVIT FROM THE TRANSLATOR mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC. 20520 (NATIONAL IRANIAN TANKER CORPORATION) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8127 2535, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
December 13, 2013 Filing 68 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2, SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2011, COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED JULY 2, 2013, SUMMONSES, LETTERS ROGATORY, AND APPLICABLE FSIA TEX. DOCUMENTS IN BOTH ENGLISH AND FARSI FOR EACH EIGHT DEFENDANTS AS WELL AS AN AFFIDAVIT FROM THE TRANSLATOR. mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC. 20520 ALI AKBAR HASHEMI RAFSANJANI on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8128 5075, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
December 13, 2013 Filing 67 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the NOTICE OF SUIT PREPARED IN ACCORDANCE WITH 22 CFR 93.2, SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEEMED FILED ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2011, COURT ORDER, DOCUMENT 2734, DATED JULY 2, 2013, SUMMONSES, LETTERS ROGATORY, AND APPLICABLE FSIA TEX. DOCUMENTS IN BOTH ENGLISH AND FARSI FOR EACH EIGHT DEFENDANTS AS WELL AS AN AFFIDAVIT FROM THE TRANSLATOR. mailed to POLICY REVIEW & INTER-AGENCY LIASON, SEC. OF STATE DIR. CONSULAR SERV. (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPT. OF STATE SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, 2201 C ST. NW, WASHINGTON, DC. 20520 (AYATOLLAH ALI HOSEINI KHAMENEI) on 12/13/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7973 8128 8144, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; granting (63) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD. It is hereby ORDERED and DECREED that Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. This Court shall issue Letters Rogatory directed to the Islamic Republic of Iran, substantially similar in form to that attached as EXHIBIT A to Plaintiffs' Motion, requesting assistance in serving the Order and Judgment issued by this Court, and the necessary accompanying documents, upon the following Defendants as further set forth in this order. The U.S. Department of State shall transmit the Letters Rogatory and the accompanying legal documents, including the translations, related to the Second Amended Complaint to the appropriate judicial authority of the Islamic Republic of Iran pursuant to 1608(b)(3)(A). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 11/26/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD (lmb)
October 28, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE of of Pending Action Pursuant to Section 1605(g)(1) of FSIA. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(Mellon, Thomas)
October 25, 2013 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #63 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory as to Khamenei, Rafsanjani, NITC, NIOC, NIGC, NIPC, Iran Airlines, and Hezbollah in Switzerland Directed Toward The Islamic Republic of Iran.. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Mellon, Thomas)
October 25, 2013 Filing 63 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory as to Khamenei, Rafsanjani, NITC, NIOC, NIGC, NIPC, Iran Airlines, and Hezbollah in Switzerland Directed Toward The Islamic Republic of Iran. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Letters Rogatory, #3 Exhibit B - Hague Convention Signatories, #4 Exhibit C - SDNY Foreign Mailing Instructions, #5 Exhibit D - Certificate of Mailing, #6 Exhibit E - DHL Mailing Summary, #7 Exhibit F - Department of State Letter, #8 Exhibit G - Order Granting Letters Rogatory in Havlish, et al. v. bin Laden, et al.)(Mellon, Thomas)
October 22, 2013 Filing 62 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Geraldine Deborah Spaeter, Richard Fernandez, Carolee Azzarello, Julie Bertelsen Hoglan, Loretta Haines, Brenda Jobe, Aleese M. Hartmann, Charles Edward Gengler, Dian Dembinski, Jason Diehl, all plaintiffs, Carolyn Sutton, Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan, Candyce Sue Hoglan, Keith Bradkowski, Arline Peabody, Jane G. Haller, Brian Major, Hoglan Plaintiffs, Alice Hoglan, Colleen Mcdonald, Vicki Lynn Michel, Joanann Coale, Anthony Dorf, D. Linden Hoglan, Maria Joule, Tina Grazioso, Kathryn Collman, Krysty Grazioso, Susan Bohan, Nicholas Chirchirillo, Leslie Coale Brown, Sandra Grazioso, Jack Bradish, Lee N. Hoglan, Emma Fernandez Regan, Jeannette Diehl, Vaughn V. Hoglan, Michael Chirchirillo, Kelly Arthurs, Michelle Clendenney, Karen Ventre, Carole Grazioso, Steve Gengler, Cirilo Fernandez, Joseph Carpeneto, Herbert Hoglan, Karen Bingham, Renee L. Gamboa, Jeannette Coffey, Rachel G. Malubay, Stephen Bradish, Grace Parkinson-godshalk, Heather Strickland. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Heather Strickland, Karen Bingham, Alice Hoglan, all plaintiffs, Kelly Arthurs.(ama) (sdi).
October 9, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT IN ACCORDANCE 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEEMED FILED 9/9/11; SUMMONS AND ORDER DATED 7/2/13; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT; TWO COPIES OF EACH DOCUMENT IN ENGLISH AND FARSI; AFFIDAVIT FROM TRANSLATOR (MINISTRY OF DEFENSE AND ARMED FORCES LOGISTICS) mailed to DIRECTOR OF CONSULAR SERVICE (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, 2201 C STREET, NW, SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3459 5282, as per #60 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 10/10/2013. (Kaliakina, Tatiana)
October 9, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT IN ACCORDANCE 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEEMED FILED 9/9/11; SUMMONS AND ORDER DATED 7/2/13; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT; TWO COPIES OF EACH DOCUMENT IN ENGLISH AND FARSI; AFFIDAVIT FROM TRANSLATOR (MINISTRY OF COMMERCE) mailed to DIRECTOR OF CONSULAR SERVICE (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, 2201 C STREET, NW, SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3466 9244, as per #59 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 10/10/2013. (Kaliakina, Tatiana)
October 9, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT IN ACCORDANCE 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEEMED FILED 9/9/11; SUMMONS AND ORDER DATED 7/2/13; APPLICABLE FSIA TEX; TWO COPIES OF EACH DOCUMENT IN ENGLISH AND FARSI; AFFIDAVIT FROM TRANSLATOR (MINISTRY OF INFORMATION & SECURITY) mailed to DIRECTOR OF CONSULAR SERVICE (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, 2201 C STREET, NW, SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3448 7443, as per #55 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 10/10/2013. (Kaliakina, Tatiana)
October 9, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT IN ACCORDANCE 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEEMED FILED 9/9/11; SUMMONS AND ORDER DATED 7/2/13; APPLICABLE FSIA TEX; TWO COPIES OF EACH DOCUMENT IN ENGLISH AND FARSI; AFFIDAVIT FROM TRANSLATOR (MINISTRY OF ECONOMIC AFFAIRS & FINANCE) mailed to DIRECTOR OF CONSULAR SERVICE (CAOCSPRI), U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, 2201 C STREET, NW, SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3474 8190, as per #54 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 10/10/2013. (Kaliakina, Tatiana)
October 9, 2013 Filing 61 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Suit in accordance 22CFR 93.2, Second Amended Complaint deemed filed 9/9/11, Summons and Order dated 7/2/13, Applicable FSIA text, Two copies of each document in English and Farsi, Affidavit from Translator (Ministry of Petroleum) mailed to Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 10/8/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3444 2150, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
October 9, 2013 Filing 60 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Suit in accordance 22CFR 93.2, Second Amended Complaint deemed filed 9/9/11, Summons and Order dated 7/2/13, Applicable FSIA text, Two copies of each document in English and Farsi, Affidavit from Translator mailed to Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 ( Ministry of Defense and Armed Forces Logistics) on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3459 5282, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
October 9, 2013 Filing 59 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Suit in accordance 22CFR 93.2, Second Amended Complaint deemed filed 9/9/11, Summons and Order dated 7/2/13, Applicable FSIA text, Two copies of each document in English and Farsi, Affidavit from Translator mailed to Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 (Ministry of Commerce) on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3466 9244, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
October 9, 2013 Filing 58 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Suit in accordance 22CFR 93.2, Second Amended Complaint deemed filed 9/9/11, Summons and Order dated 7/2/13, Applicable FSIA text, Two copies of each document in English and Farsi, Affidavit from Translator mailed to Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3462 8690 (jvs)
October 9, 2013 Filing 57 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the two copies of the Notice of Suit in accordance 22CFR 93.2, Second Amended Complaint deemed filed 9/9/11, Summons and Order dated 7/2/13, Applicable FSIA text, Two copies of each document in English and Farsi, Affidavit from Translator mailed to Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 ( Islamic Republic of Iran) on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3435 6515, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
October 9, 2013 Filing 56 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the two copies of the Notice of Suit in accordance 22CFR 93.2, Second Amended Complaint deemed filed 9/9/11, Summons and Order dated 7/2/13, Applicable FSIA text, Two copies of each document in English and Farsi, Affidavit from Translator mailed to Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 (Ministry of Foreign Affairs) on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3438 9248, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
October 9, 2013 Filing 55 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the two copies of the Notice of Suit in accordance 22CFR 93.2, Second Amended Complaint deemed filed 9/9/11, Summons and Order dated 7/2/13, Applicable FSIA text, Two copies of each document in English and Farsi, Affidavit from Translator (Ministry of Information and Security) mailed to Director of Consular Service (CAOCSPRI), U.S. Department of State, 2201 C Street, NW, SA-29, 4th Floor, Washington, DC 20520 on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3448 7443, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
October 9, 2013 Filing 54 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Suit in accordance 22CFR 93.2, Second Amended Complaint deemed filed 9/9/11, Summons and Order dated 7/2/13, Applicable FSIA text, Two copies of each document in English and Farsi, Affidavit from Translator (Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance) mailed to Director of Consular Service (CAOCSPRI), U.S. Department of State, 2201 C Street, NW, SA-29, 4th Floor, Washington, DC 20520 on 10/9/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3474 8190, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (jvs)
October 8, 2013 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for NOTICE OF SUIT IN ACCORDANCE 22 CFR 93.2; SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DEEMED FILED 9/9/11; SUMMONS AND ORDER DATED 7/2/13; APPLICABLE FSIA TEXT; TWO COPIES OF EACH DOCUMENT IN ENGLISH AND FARSI; AFFIDAVIT FROM TRANSLATOR mailed to DIRECTOR OF CONSULAR SERVICE, U.S. DEPT. OF STATE, 2201 C STREET, NW, SA-29, 4TH FLOOR, WASHINGTON, DC 20520 on 10/8/2013 by Federal Express tracking # 7968 3444 2150, as per #61 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 10/9/2013. (Kaliakina, Tatiana)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: The discovery conference scheduled for September 10, 2013 is adjourned. By September 13, 2013, the parties shall submit a joint letter to my Chambers providing their availability for a further conference during the week of October 28, 2013. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies Sent By Chambers. (cd)
July 31, 2013 Filing 47 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, NOTICE OF SUIT PURSUANT TO 22 93.2, FOREIGN SOVEREIGN IMMUNITES ACT, ENGLISH AND FARSI TRANSLATION, AFFIDAVIT mailed to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN C/O H.E. ALI AKBAR SALEHI PH D, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS, IMAM KHOMENINI STREET, TEHRAN, IRAN on 7/31/2013 by DHL tracking # 94 9372 8602, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
July 31, 2013 Filing 46 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, SUMMON, NOTICE OF SUIT PURSUANT TO 22 93.2, FOREIGN SOVEREIGN IMMUNITES ACT, ENGLISH AND FARSI TRANSLATION, AFFIDAVIT mailed to ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS C/O H.E. ALI AKBAR SALEHI P.H. D, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS, IMAM KHOMENINI STREET, TEHRAN, IRAN on 7/30/2013 by DHL tracking # 94 9374 8880, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
July 30, 2013 Filing 52 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, SUMMON, NOTICE OF SUIT PURSUANT TO 22 93.2, FOREIGN SOVEREIGN IMMUNITES ACT, ENGLISH AND FARSI TRANSLATION, AFFIDAVIT mailed to ALI AKBAR HASHEMI RAFSANJANI C/O H.E. ALI AKBAR SALEHI P.H. D, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS, IMAM KHOMENINI STREET, TEHRAN, IRAN on 7/30/2013 by DHL tracking # 94 9373 7072, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
July 30, 2013 Filing 51 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, SUMMON, NOTICE OF SUIT PURSUANT TO 22 93.2, FOREIGN SOVEREIGN IMMUNITES ACT, ENGLISH AND FARSI TRANSLATION, AFFIDAVIT mailed to AYATOLLAH ALI HOSENEI KHAMENEI C/O H.E. ALI AKBAR SALEHI P.H. D, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS, IMAM KHOMENINI STREET, TEHRAN, IRAN on 7/30/2013 by DHL tracking # 94 9373 4073, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
July 30, 2013 Filing 50 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, SUMMON, NOTICE OF SUIT PURSUANT TO 22 93.2, FOREIGN SOVEREIGN IMMUNITES ACT, ENGLISH AND FARSI TRANSLATION, AFFIDAVIT mailed to NATIONAL IRANIAN GAS COMPANY C/O H.E. ALI AKBAR SALEHI P.H. D, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS, IMAM KHOMENINI STREET, TEHRAN, IRAN on 7/30/2013 by DHL tracking # 94 9374 2193, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
July 30, 2013 Filing 49 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, SUMMON, NOTICE OF SUIT PURSUANT TO 22 93.2, FOREIGN SOVEREIGN IMMUNITES ACT, ENGLISH AND FARSI TRANSLATION, AFFIDAVIT mailed to NATIONAL IARANIAN OIL COMPANY C/O H.E. ALI AKBAR SALEHI P.H. D, MINISTRY OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS, IMAM KHOMENINI STREET, TEHRAN, IRAN on 7/30/2013 by DHL tracking # 94 9373 9242, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
July 30, 2013 Filing 48 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, SUMMON, NOTICE OF SUIT PURSUANT TO 22 93.2, FOREIGN SOVEREIGN IMMUNITES ACT, ENGLISH AND FARSI TRANSLATION, AFFIDAVIT mailed to HEZBOLLAH C/O H.E. Dr. Ali Akbar Salehi Minister of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran Imam Khomeini Street Tehran, Iran on 7/30/2013 by DHL tracking # 94 9376 1480, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
July 30, 2013 Filing 45 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Second Amended Complaint Summons Notice of Suit Pursuant to 22 CFR 93.2; Copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act mailed to NATIONAL IRANIAN PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY c/o H.E. Dr. Ali Akbar Salehi Minister of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran Imam Khomeini Street Tehran, Iran on 7/30/2013 by DHL tracking # 94 9374 6533, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(jvs)
July 30, 2013 Filing 44 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Second Amended Complaint Summons Notice of Suit Pursuant to 22 CFR 93.2; Copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act mailed to MINISTRY OF INFORMATION & SECURITY C/O H.E. DR. ALI AKBAR SALEHI, MINISTER OF FOREIGN AFFAIRS OF THE ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN IMAM KHOMEINI STREET, TEHRAN IRAN on 7/30/2013 by DHL tracking # 94 9374 0900, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (jvs)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (2693) Motion for James Patrick McCoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; Granting (27) Motion for James Patrick McCoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 7/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD (rjm)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED and DECREED that: (1) Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint shall relate back to the filing of the Complaint on September 9, 2011, and be deemed as filed on that date; and, (2) Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Paragraph 26 on Page 28 of the Second Amended Complaint is hereby amended to state as follows: Joseph Carpeneto, named in his own right and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joyce Ann Carpeneto, is a surviving Brother of Joyce Ann Carpeneto, one of the Decedents murdered as a result of the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001, that were carried out by Defendants al-Qaeda and Osama bin Laden, Deceased, and to which Iran and the Iranian Defendants provided material support and assistance in furtherance of the attacks. (3) The Clerk of the Court shall mark ECF No. 2645 closed. Plaintiffs shall file a copy of the Second Amended Complaint, with the above correction included, with the Clerk of Court upon the entry of this Order by the Court. Granting (2645) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; Granting (19) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 7/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(rjm)
June 21, 2013 Filing 41 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Martin F. McMahon dated 6/20/2013 re: I have a serious conflict regarding next Friday's appearance with you on June 28th. Can I participate by phone instead? I would need a call-in number of course. I do not think that the plaintiffs would oppose this request, and I have emailed them to confirm. I appreciate the courtesy. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. Mr. McMahon should telephone (212)805-4051 five minutes before the scheduled conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 6/21/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the May 30, 2013 conference is adjourned to June 28, 2013, at 11 a.m. The conference shall take place in Courtroom 20A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 6/28/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 5/24/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies Sent By Chambers to Honorable George B. Daniels(djc)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Pursuant to the conference held on April 16, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By April 30, 2013, Mr. Haefele shall submit a letter setting forth any reasons that the parties should not be required to move jointly before Judge Gershon to modify the protective order in Linde v. Arab Bank, PLC, such that any documents protected by the order may be disclosed in this litigation. 2. Also by April 30, 2013, Mr. Haefele shall submit any additional letter-briefing as to whether Plaintiffs may rely on the work-product doctrine to withhold certain documents related to their prior FOIA requests. 3. A further conference shall be held on May 30, 2013, at 12 p.m., in Courtroom 20A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. ( Status Conference set for 5/30/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 4/22/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers to Honorable George B. Daniels. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. (djc) Modified on 4/23/2013 (djc).
April 4, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/19/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 4, 2013 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Pursuant to the conference held on March 19, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By March 29, 2013, Al-Haramain shall produce any paper documents received pursuant to Judge Aiken's order that are responsive to the plaintiffs' requests. By that date, Al-Haramain also shall produce a privilege log for any such documents as to which privilege is claimed. 2. By April 19, 2013, Al-Haramain shall produce any remaining documents or files received pursuant to Judge Aiken's order that are responsive to the plaintiffs' requests and, if applicable, a corresponding privilege log. 3. The Court will reserve decision on the plaintiffs' motion for sanctions against Al-Haramain. 4. A further conference shall be held on April 16, 2013. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 3/19/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers to Honorable George B. Daniels Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc)
March 12, 2013 Filing 35 Reply Letter Brief (as to defendant Rabita Trust, with Exhibits A-Ct)addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 3/12/2013 re: The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees, on behalf of all plaintiffs, submit this reply in further support of plaintiffs' January 30, 2013 motion to compel ("Motion to Compel") defendant Rabita Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc)
March 12, 2013 Filing 34 Reply Letter Brief (as to defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, with Exhibit A) addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 3/12/2013 re: The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees, on behalf of all plaintiffs, submit this reply in further support of their January 30, 2013 motion to compel ("Motion to Compel") defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan to produce: (1) all documentation and information verifying efforts the defendant and his counsel have undertaken to request and secure documents responsive to plaintiffs' requests for production of documents, consistent with this Court's November 16, 2011 Order as set forth herein; Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc) Modified on 3/15/2013 (djc).
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. At the request of counsel for the plaintiffs and defendants Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan and Rabita Trust, the Court directs that the following items be separately docketed as of record by the Clerk of the Court with the Court's ECF System: (a) Plaintiffs' January 30, 2013 opening letter brief as to defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, including Exhibits A-D; (b) Plaintiffs' January 30, 2013 opening letter brief as to defendant Rabita Trust, including Exhibits A-N; (c) Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan's March 1, 2013 opposition brief, including Exhibits 1-10; (d) Defendant Rabita Trust's March 1, 2013 opposition brief, including Exhibits 1-6; (e) Plaintiffs' March 12, 2013 reply letter brief as to defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, including Exhibit A; and (f) Plaintiffs' March 12, 2013 reply letter brief as to defendant Rabita Trust, including Exhibits A-C. 2. A copy of this Order shall accompany those filings. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 3/12/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc) Modified on 3/14/2013 (djc).
March 1, 2013 Filing 33 OPPOSITION Letter Brief of Defendant Rabita Trust with Exhibits 1-6 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc) Modified on 3/15/2013 (djc).
March 1, 2013 Filing 32 OPPOSITION Letter brief of Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, including exhibits 1-10. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc)
February 28, 2013 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #29 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ja)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting (2695) Motion for Melina M. Goldfarb to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; granting [] Motion for Melina M. Goldfarb to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/28/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(ja)
February 25, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for James Patrick McCoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8265024. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 25, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION for James Patrick McCoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8265024. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Cert. of Good Standing (PA), #3 Exhibit B - Cert. of Good Standing (NJ))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(McCoy, James)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Pursuant to the telephone conference held on February 21, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By February 28, 2013, each defendant that has produced documents, but has not served a privilege log, shall submit a letter to the Plaintiffs confirming that no documents have been withheld pursuant to the attorney-client privilege or work/product doctrine. 2. Also by February 28, 2013, any defendant who has withheld all of its documents on the basis of privilege or work/product protection shall submit a letter to the Plaintiffs explaining their reason for not submitting a privilege log. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 2/21/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies Sent By Chambers to Honorable George B. Daniels. (djc)
February 21, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas: Telephone Conference held on 2/21/2013. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(cd)
February 19, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Dennis George Pantazis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8239814. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Expired Certificate of Good Standing. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (bcu)
February 15, 2013 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Dennis George Pantazis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8239814. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Pantazis, Dennis) Modified on 2/19/2013 (bcu).
February 15, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellon, Thomas)
February 8, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. [2654, et al] HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney Robert Turner Haefele : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(db)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (2675) Motion for Thomas Edward Mellon, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; granting [] Motion for Thomas Edward Mellon, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting [] Motion for Thomas Edward Mellon, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD. The Motion of THOMAS EDWARD MELLON, III, ESQUIRE for admission to practicePro Hac Vice in the above-captioned matter is hereby GRANTED.(Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/05/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(ama)
January 30, 2013 Filing 31 Opening Letter Brief (as to defendant Rabita Trust w. Exhibits A-N) addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/30/2012 re: The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees, on behalf of all plaintiffs, submit this letter and the accompanying exhibits and respectfully request that the Court enter an Order, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(a), compelling defendant Rabita Trust, an Executive Order 13224 designee as set forth herein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc)
January 30, 2013 Filing 30 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/30/2013 re: The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees, on behalf of all plaintiffs, submit this letter and the accompanying exhibits and respectfully request that the Court enter an Order, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(a), compelling defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, a co-founder of al Qaeda and Executive Order 13224 designee as set forth herein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc) Modified on 3/15/2013 (djc).
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. At the request of the counsel for the Plaintiffs, the Court directs that the following items be separately docketed as of record by the Clerk of the Court with the Court's ECF system: (1) the Letter Memorandum of the Plaintiffs, dated January 9, 2013, seeking imposition of sanctions against defendant Al Haramain, and (2) the attorney declaration of Robert T. Haefele, with accompanying Exhibits A-Y, in support of the Plaintiffs' request, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that 2. Defendant Al Haramain and the plaintiffs may file their respective opposition and reply papers concerning the above-referenced motion via the Court's ECF system, and a copy of this order shall accompany those filings. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 1/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies via ECF.(mro)
December 19, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/22/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
December 19, 2012 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/22/2012 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/14/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 28, 2012 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:11-cv-07550-GBD(Mellon, Thomas)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GOVERNING IDENTIFICATION OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 11/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(js)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/22/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Plaintiffs should initiate the call. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies Sent By Chambers(cd)
April 24, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Note to Attorney Jerry Goldman that Document No. #16 was incorrectly filed in this case. It should have been filed only in cases: 03md1570, 04cv1922. (nd)
April 24, 2012 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE - CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (2588 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 309 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD) Notice of Appeal,. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Sandra Lang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 4/24/2012 (nd).
March 19, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Martin J. Schwartz. Document filed by Banca Del Gottardo. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Schwartz, Martin)
March 16, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Hugh D. Higgins. Document filed by Faisal Islamic Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Lauro, John)
March 13, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/15/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 13, 2012 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 2/15/2012 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 28, 2011 Filing 11 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Omar Mohammedi and Frederick Goetz dated 12/28/2011 re: Request for the postponement of the 1/13/2012 hearing. ENDORSEMENT: The 1/13th conference was set up to follow Judge Daniels' conference earlier the same day and obviously involves numerous parties. I therefore am unwilling to move it simply to address these discrete issues. We can address the issues at the 2/15 conference and make any necessary adjustment in the discovery schedule following at that time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(cd)
December 20, 2011 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (2495 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Objection (non-motion) - Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Perouz Sedaghaty's Rule 72 Objections to Magistrate Judge Maas' November 22, 2011 Ruling. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
October 27, 2011 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 27, 2011 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 27, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 27, 2011 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM. (sjo)
October 27, 2011 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM. (sjo)
October 27, 2011 Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (sjo)
October 27, 2011 Filing 7 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of District of Columbia; Case Number: 1:11-cv-01634. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 27, 2011 Case transferred out to the USDC for the Southern District of New York, pursuant to Court Order entered 10/25/11. Sent to Court by extraction. (ztnr, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/27/2011.]
October 27, 2011 Filing 6 EMAIL dated 10/25/11 from the U.S. District Court for Southern District of New York requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/27/2011.]
September 13, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's notice due by 9/30/2011. (cdw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/27/2011.]
September 28, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Proof of Notice of Tag Along Action Filed with US JPMDL by ALL PLAINTIFFS re Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Fleming, Timothy) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/27/2011.]
September 13, 2011 Filing 3 First Amended Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Fleming, Timothy) Modified on 9/14/2011 to correct event(rdj). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/27/2011.]
September 13, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's notice due by 9/30/2011. (cdw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/27/2011.]
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER requiring Plaintiffs to file, no later than September 30, 2011, proof that they have notified the Multidistrict Litigation Panel that this case is a potential tag-a-long action to MDL No. 1570, 03-cv-9848 (SDNY). See MDL Panel Rule 7.1. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/13/2011. (KD) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/27/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 9 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Robert T. Faefele dated 7/6/2011 re: For the Plaintiffs Executive Committees on behalf of all of the plaintiffs ("Plaintiffs"), we write in reply to the June 29, 2011 letter of defendant Perouz Sedaghaty (a/k/a Pete Seda, a/k/a Abu Yunas) ("Sedaghaty") and in further support of Plaintiffs' request dated June 17, 2011, and as further specified in this letter. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
June 17, 2011 Filing 8 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 6/17/2011 re: We write for the Plaintiffs Executive Committees on behalf of all of the plaintiffs ("Plaintiffs") to ask the Court for an order under Rule 37 (a)(3)(B)(iv) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure compelling defendant Perouz Sedaghaty (a/k/a Pete Seda, a/k/a Abu Yunas) ("Sedaghaty") to produce the information requested in Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Perouz Sedaghaty, served on Sedaghaty on December 10, 2010, and never answered.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(lmb)
September 9, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, AYATOLLAH ALI HOSEINI KHAMENEI, ALI AKBAR HASHEMI RAFSANJANI ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616042104) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, KELLY ARTHURS, KAREN BINGHAM, ALICE HOGLAN, HEATHER STRICKLAND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Addresses of Hoglan plaintiffs (lodged under seal))(rdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/27/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOGLAN et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansar bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehr bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonyad Taavon Sepah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pars oil & gas company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liner transport kish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iranian ministry of defense and armed force logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moallem insurance company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iran Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iranian Ministry of Petroleum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National iranian petrochemical company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: all defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National iranian oil corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iranian Ministry of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iranian Ministry of Economic Affairs and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehr finance and credit institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonyad-e ta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irgc cooperative foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansar financial and credit institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansar finance and credit fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iranian Ministry of Information and Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National iranian gas company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepah cooperative foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National iranian tanker corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ltk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pogc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran Shipping Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central bank of the islamic republic of iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hezbollah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehr interest-free bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Bradish
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Hoglan
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Haines
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirilo Fernandez
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Huber
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addison Friedman
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Grazioso
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Woods
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Lostrangio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Strickland
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Rowe
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Parkinson-godshalk
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dov Shefi
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: all plaintiffs
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Stephen A. Corr
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel G. Malubay
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Pappasso
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Mandelino
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Jobe
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane G. Haller
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Kramer
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Joule
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Friedman-Ceraso
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawanda Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candyce Sue Hoglan
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Pino
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Gengler
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dian Dembinski
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Model
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Ognibene
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Fernandez Regan
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Ward
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bohan
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dorf
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Diehl
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn V. Hoglan
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Major
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Pendergraft
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Bertelsen Hoglan
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Arthurs
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Montoya
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Chirchirillo
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Grazioso
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Baker
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Caloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krysty Grazioso
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bingham
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Druckenmiller
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ventre
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Edward Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yishai Shefi
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Hoagland
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Corbett-Moran
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanann Coale
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Cofresi
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Woods
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Deborah Spaeter
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Fernandez
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Gengler
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Fuller
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolee Azzarello
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Brady knudsen Hoglan
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Coffey
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Diehl
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Ward
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Gerardino
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristyn Steiner Martin
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Steiner Keller
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoglan Plaintiffs
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Stephen A. Corr
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Reiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Rowe
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Carpeneto
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Borzumato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Halvorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mandelino, Sr.
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mandelino, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Grazioso
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigal Asher-Shefi
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnne Lovett
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troia Johnson
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bradish
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Mcdonald
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Lynn Michel
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Represented By: Timothy B. Fleming
Represented By: Melina M. Goldfarb
Represented By: Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Represented By: James McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Rivka-Shefi
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Pino
Represented By: Thomas E. Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times