Nova Group, Inc v. Universitas Education, LLC
Petitioner: Nova Group, Inc
Respondent: Universitas Education, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv08726
Filed: December 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER terminating 424 Motion for Reconsideration re 424 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 34 Clerk's Judgment, filed by Daniel Carpenter. It is hereby ORDERED, that the above-referenced motions (docket entry nos. 700 in 11-C V1590, and 424 in 11-CV-8726) are hereby TERMINATED for purposes of the Court's docket, without prejudice to reinstatement upon application, upon notice to adverse parties and accompanied by the requisite certification; it is further ORDER ED, that no response to the motions is required unless a reinstatement application is granted, in which case the time to respond of any adverse party will be calculated from the date of service of the order of reinstatement and in accordance wi th Local Civil Rule 6.1 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Furthermore, the Court directs the parties' attention to S.D.N.Y. Local Civil Rules 6.1(b), 7.2, and 12.1. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter a copy of this order in 11-CV1590 and 11-CV-8726. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/1/2021) (va)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 166 Report and Recommendations. The Court has not received any objections to the Report from either Universitas or Nova, so a review for clear error is appropriate. The Court has reviewed care fully Magistrate Judge Pitman's thorough Report and finds no clear error. The Court therefore adopts the Report in its entirety for the reasons stated therein. Because the Report explicitly states that "[f]ailure to object within fourteen ( 14) days will result in a waiver of objections and will preclude appellate review," the parties' failure to object operates as a waiver of objections and appellate review. See Graham v. City of New York, 433 Fed. App'x 657, 658 (2d Cir . 2011). This Memorandum Order Adopting Report and Recommendation resolves docket entry number 173 in 11 CV 1590 and docket entry number 115 in 11 CV 8726. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/16/2016) (spo)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 315 AMENDED ORDER: For the aforementioned reasons, Universitas is granted $1,131,472.84 in attorneys' fees and costs, and $134,015.85 in post-judgment interest against Nova, without prejudice to further interest accruals on unsatisfied amo unts. Universitas' request to reduce the October 5, 2012, attorneys' fee award of $268,810.01 against Nova to judgment is granted. The Clerk of the Court is requested to vacate the judgment entered on October 1, 2014 (docket entry no. 489) and enter a new judgment consistent with this Amended Order. This Amended Order resolves docket numbers 314 and 330. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/8/2014) (ajs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nova Group, Inc v. Universitas Education, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nova Group, Inc
Represented By: Joseph M. Pastore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Universitas Education, LLC
Represented By: Michael Steven Barnett
Represented By: Paula Kae Colbath
Represented By: James Timothy Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?