Petru et al v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Anthony Petru, Marcus Mathis, Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales and Steven Rivers
Defendant: Apple, Inc., Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., Penguin Group (USA) Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Miscellaneous: Patsy Diamond
Movant: Katrina Key
Case Number: 1:2011cv09016
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Denise L. Cote
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Hagens Berman LLP and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC shall serve as Co-Lead Counsel for all plaintiffs in this action and the class. Every pleading filed in this action, and in any separate action subsequently included therein, shall bear the following caption: IN RE: ELECTRONIC BOOKS ANTITRUST LITIGATION. Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2012. Motions due by 4/13/2012. Responses due by 5/11/2012. Replies due by 5/25/2012. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/21/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02293-DLC et al.(ft)
December 20, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/20/2011. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02293-DLC et al.(js)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: That the Court waives any interest it might have in this putative class action lawsuit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any motion for class certification made in this action shall define the class so as to exclude individuals described in 28 U.S.C. § 455 (b) (4) -(5). (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02293-DLC et al.(rdz)
December 19, 2011 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman in Support re: (62 in 1:11-cv-05576-DLC, 70 in 1:11-cv-09016-DLC, 14 in 1:11-cv-08608-DLC, 44 in 1:11-cv-05750-DLC, 34 in 1:11-cv-05896-DLC, 33 in 1:11-cv-05976-DLC, 31 in 1:11-cv-09014-DLC, 43 in 1:11-cv-05609-DLC, 30 in 1:11-cv-07507-DLC, 13 in 1:11-cv-08329-DLC, 33 in 1:11-cv-05898-DLC, 22 in 1:11-cv-07323-DLC, 61 in 1:11-cv-05707-DLC, 31 in 1:11-cv-06079-DLC, 19 in 1:11-md-02293-DLC, 21 in 1:11-cv-07534-DLC, 38 in 1:11-cv-06019-DLC, 60 in 1:11-cv-05621-DLC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Hagens Berman Interim Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02293-DLC et al.(Berman, Steve)
December 19, 2011 Filing 70 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Hagens Berman Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Anthony Petru.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02293-DLC et al.(Berman, Steve)
December 19, 2011 Filing 69 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Hagens Berman's Application to be Appointed Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Anthony Petru.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02293-DLC et al.(Berman, Steve)
December 19, 2011 Filing 68 BRIEF Plaintiff Rhonda Burstein's Application for the Appointment of Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. as Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Rhonda Burstein. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02293-DLC et al.(Nussbaum, Linda)
December 19, 2011 Filing 67 BRIEF re: (10 in 1:11-cv-08608-DLC, 25 in 1:11-cv-09014-DLC, 29 in 1:11-cv-05976-DLC, 30 in 1:11-cv-05896-DLC, 17 in 1:11-cv-07534-DLC, 57 in 1:11-cv-05707-DLC, 40 in 1:11-cv-05750-DLC, 58 in 1:11-cv-05576-DLC, 66 in 1:11-cv-09016-DLC, 26 in 1:11-cv-07507-DLC, 39 in 1:11-cv-05609-DLC, 11 in 1:11-md-02293-DLC, 9 in 1:11-cv-08329-DLC, 34 in 1:11-cv-06019-DLC, 29 in 1:11-cv-05898-DLC, 27 in 1:11-cv-06079-DLC, 56 in 1:11-cv-05621-DLC, 18 in 1:11-cv-07323-DLC) Brief,,,, Declaration of Kit A. Pierson in Support of Application of Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC Seeking Appointment to Represent Consolidated Putative Class. Document filed by Marcia Greene, Aubrie Ann Jones, Cyrus Joubin, Kevin Rader-Rhodenbaugh, Harrison Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02293-DLC et al.(Pierson, Kit)
December 19, 2011 Filing 66 BRIEF re: (24 in 1:11-cv-07507-DLC, 24 in 1:11-cv-07507-DLC, 28 in 1:11-cv-05896-DLC, 28 in 1:11-cv-05896-DLC, 37 in 1:11-cv-05609-DLC, 37 in 1:11-cv-05609-DLC, 27 in 1:11-cv-05898-DLC, 27 in 1:11-cv-05898-DLC, 54 in 1:11-cv-05621-DLC, 54 in 1:11-cv-05621-DLC, 7 in 1:11-cv-08329-DLC, 7 in 1:11-cv-08329-DLC, 15 in 1:11-cv-07534-DLC, 15 in 1:11-cv-07534-DLC, 38 in 1:11-cv-05750-DLC, 38 in 1:11-cv-05750-DLC, 32 in 1:11-cv-06019-DLC, 32 in 1:11-cv-06019-DLC, 3 in 1:11-md-02293-DLC, 3 in 1:11-md-02293-DLC, 16 in 1:11-cv-07323-DLC, 16 in 1:11-cv-07323-DLC, 25 in 1:11-cv-06079-DLC, 25 in 1:11-cv-06079-DLC, 56 in 1:11-cv-05576-DLC, 56 in 1:11-cv-05576-DLC, 55 in 1:11-cv-05707-DLC, 55 in 1:11-cv-05707-DLC, 8 in 1:11-cv-08608-DLC, 8 in 1:11-cv-08608-DLC, 27 in 1:11-cv-05976-DLC, 27 in 1:11-cv-05976-DLC) Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, Application of Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC Seeking Appointment to Represent Consolidated Putative Class. Document filed by Marcia Greene, Aubrie Ann Jones, Cyrus Joubin, Kevin Rader-Rhodenbaugh, Harrison Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02293-DLC et al.(Pierson, Kit)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
December 19, 2011 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
December 19, 2011 Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (sjo)
December 19, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
December 19, 2011 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:11-md-02293-DLC. (sjo)
December 19, 2011 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-md-02293-DLC. (sjo)
December 19, 2011 Filing 64 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:11-cv-03892. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
December 14, 2011 Filing 63 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of New York. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
December 14, 2011 Filing 62 TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:11-cv-03954-EMC; granting (56) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:11-cv-03892-EMC (Miller v. Hachette) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:11-cv-03954-EMC; granting (20) Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Joseph Guglielmo) in case 3:11-cv-04754-EMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 18, 2011 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. re 58 Declaration in Support, 57 Proposed Order, 56 MOTION to Relate Case (Miller, et al. v. Hachette Book Group, Inc., et al.) (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 18, 2011 Filing 58 Declaration of Richard S. Horvath, Jr. in Support of 56 MOTION to Relate Case (Miller, et al. v. Hachette Book Group, Inc., et al.) filed byHarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 56 ) (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 18, 2011 Filing 57 Proposed Order re 56 MOTION to Relate Case (Miller, et al. v. Hachette Book Group, Inc., et al.) by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 18, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION to Relate Case (Miller, et al. v. Hachette Book Group, Inc., et al.) filed by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 49 Motion to Relate Case (C11-4490) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 46 Motion to Relate Case (C11-4192) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 3, 2011 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 3, 2011 Filing 52 Proposed Order GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 3, 2011 Filing 51 EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. HORVATH, JR. IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES filed byHarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 3, 2011 Filing 50 Declaration of RICHARD S. HORVATH, JR. IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES filed byHarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 3, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION to Relate Case filed by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
November 2, 2011 Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 31, 2011 Filing 47 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Support of 46 MOTION to Relate Case filed byRebecca L. Rossman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 46 ) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 31, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Rebecca L. Rossman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 42 Motion to Relate Case (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 44 Proposed Order re 42 MOTION to Relate Case by Steven Rivers. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 10/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 43 Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of 42 MOTION to Relate Case filed bySteven Rivers. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 10/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Steven Rivers. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 10/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RELATING CASES C11-3892 EMC and C11-4500 LB. Motions terminated: 35 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 33 Motion to Relate Case (C11-4754 Key v. Apple) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 39 Declaration of Harry Shulman in Support of 35 MOTION to Relate Case CORRECTION OF DOCKET #36 filed byEugenia Ruane-Gonzales. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 10/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales re 35 MOTION to Relate Case (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 10/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 37 Proposed Order re 35 MOTION to Relate Case by Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales. (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 10/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 36 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 39 . *** Declaration of Harry Shulman in Support of 35 MOTION to Relate Case filed byEugenia Ruane-Gonzales. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Petru complaint), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Ruane-Gonzales complaint))(Related document(s) 35 ) (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 10/4/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 35 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales. (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 10/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
September 27, 2011 Filing 34 Declaration of Christopher M. Burke in Support of 33 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 and 7-11 filed byKatrina Key. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 33 ) (Burke, Christopher) (Filed on 9/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
September 27, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 and 7-11 filed by Katrina Key. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burke, Christopher) (Filed on 9/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 8 Motion to Relate Case; granting 12 Motion to Relate Case; granting 14 Motion to Relate Case (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Defendants' Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/1/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on Simon & Schuster Inc., c/o Becky DeGeorge, authorized agent of service on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on Penguin Group (USA) Inc., c/o Becky DeGeorge, authorized agent of service on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on Macmillan Publishers Inc., c/o Paul Matthews, managing agent on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on HarperCollins Publishers Inc., c/o Scott Lascala, authorized agent of service on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on Hachette Book Group Inc., c/o Scott Lascalia, authorized agent of service on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on Apple Inc., c/o Maria Sanchez, authorized agent of service on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTIONS OR OTHER PROCEEDINGS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J)(Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 23 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Support of 22 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Specially Appearing Defendants' Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed byMarcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 22 RESPONSE to re 20 Order Plaintiffs' Opposition to Specially Appearing Defendants' Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 29, 2011 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Penguin Group (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pearson PLC for Penguin Group (USA) Inc.. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 8/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Temporary Relief re 16 Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/28/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 26, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Raoul Dion Kennedy (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 8/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 26, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE OF PENDENCY of Actions or Other Proceedings by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 8/26/2011) Modified on 8/29/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 26, 2011 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 8/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 26, 2011 Filing 16 Ex Parte Application For The Court To Rule On Administrative Motion On An Expedited Basis, and Motion To Enlarge Time To Respond To Complaint filed by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul M. Eckles, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Proposed Order, # 11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 8/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 26, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Reginald David Steer for Defendant Penguin Group (USA) Inc. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 8/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 24, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jade Butman In Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Motion to Relate Cases, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Keller, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 22, 2011 Filing 13 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Support of 12 MOTION to Relate Case filed byMarcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 22, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Berman) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 19, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Patsy Diamond. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Michael F. Ram, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael F. Ram, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael F. Ram, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ram, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/17/11. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 17, 2011 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 11, 2011 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge & Request for Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge filed Plaintiff by Marcus Mathis & Anthony Petru. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 9, 2011 Filing 4 APPLICATION of Attorney Steve W. Berman for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice -[Filing Fee: $275.00, Receipt Number 4411007417] Filed by Plaintiffs Marcus Mathis & Anthony Petru. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 9, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 11/15/2011 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 9, 2011 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Apple, Inc., Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers, Inc., Macmillan Publishers, Inc., Penguin Group (USA) Inc. & Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]
August 9, 2011 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & Jury Trial Demanded - [Summons Issued] against Apple, Inc., Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers, Inc., Macmillan Publishers, Inc., Penguin Group (USA) Inc. & Simon & Schuster, Inc., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 44611007417] Filed by Plaintiffs Marcus Mathis &Anthony Petru. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petru et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Petru
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Represented By: Stuart McKinley Paynter
Represented By: Shana Eve Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Mathis
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Represented By: Stuart McKinley Paynter
Represented By: Shana Eve Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales
Represented By: Harry Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rivers
Represented By: Amy Marie Zeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.
Represented By: Raoul Dion Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacMillan Publishers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Group (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Reginald David Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Patsy Diamond
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Katrina Key
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?