United States of America v. Ferrone Featured Case

Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Thomas Ferrone
Case Number: 1:2011cv09516
Filed: December 27, 2011
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Saratoga
Presiding Judge: Denise L. Cote
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2011 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (pgu)
December 27, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (pgu)
December 27, 2011 Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (pgu)
December 27, 2011 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Northern; Case Number: 1:11-cv-01503. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (pgu)
December 23, 2011 3 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: to the Southern District of New York, pursuant to 28 USC section 1406 and in the interests of justice. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/23/2011. (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 12/27/2011.]
December 21, 2011 2 Summons Issued as to Thomas Ferrone. (see) [Transferred from New York Northern on 12/27/2011.]
December 21, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Ferrone filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) [Transferred from New York Northern on 12/27/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ferrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Linda L. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ferrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?