William A Niese et al v. Chandler Trust No 1 et al
Plaintiff: Hilary A Schneider, Michael J Valenti, Ann E Dilworth, Edward E Johnson, William D Wiegand, Gerald J Alcantar, Howard Weinstein, Fred A Abatemarco, Martin P Levin, Joanne K Falk, Norene Zapanta, Victoria King, Mary A Wild, Robert G Magnuson, Bruce E Barwick, Maureen G Peterson, Patricia G Campbell, Paul H Egan, Herbert J Vida, Raymond Holton, John R Murphy, Kathleen G McGuinness, Debra A Gastler, Mark E Howe, Douglas Fox, Michael E Waller, Donald F Wright, John T Nash, Scott W Kabak, Robert T Grant, Jerome S Rubin, Dennis A Shirley, Elizabeth F Redmond, Mark H Willes, James S Toedtman, Robert F Brandt, Anthony J Marro, Donald H Forst, Nancy Lobdell, Lawrence M Higby, Susan K Klutnick, S Keating Rhoads, Sally Kuekes, James W Wallace, Vance I Furukawa, Alberto Ibarguen, Delynn T Gutiry, Kimberly McCleary LaFrance, John J Zakarian, Kenneth L Halajian, Kenneth G Davis, William D Crawford, John C McKeon, Susan P Bell, David S Barrett, Sharon M Bowen, George J Cotliar, Alan L Brauer, William F Thomas, William R Isinger, Alexander Sann, Steven L Isenberg, Jean Halle, Robert F Erburu, Richard S Alfano, James H Norris, Richard W Stanton, Leo Brennan, Leo Wolinsky, Michael S Udovic, Charlotte H Hall, David A Laventhol, Michael J Forgione, R Marilyn Lee Schneider, Geraldine Scally, David A Esgro, Robert T O Sullivan, Richard T Schlosberg, III, Larry W Wangberg, Roger H Molvar, Gregory L Bowlin, Carolyn Selzer, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al., C Shelby Coffey, III, James Willard Colston, Mark H Kurtich, Nicholas H Niles, Hazel E Wilson, John M Dyer, Joan Kellermann, Efrem Zimbalist, III, Beverly Dreher, Claudia A Wade, Gary K Shorts, Jeffrey S Klein, Horst A Bergmann, Jack E Meadows, Richard Guerrero, Janis Heaphy, Todd A Becker, Patrick A Clifford, Charles I Schneider, Arnold J Kleiner, Judith S Kallet, Julia C Wilson, Nancy W O Neill, Jesse E Levine, Jeffrey W Lankey, Edward J Gottsman, John M Arthur, Judith L Sweeney, Donald S Maxwell, C Michael Armstrong, James D Helin, Michael S Dubester, Curtis A Hessler, Karen J Wada, Jack L Plank, James H Higby, James Imbriaco, Harold F Woldt, Jr, Phillip L Williams, Elizabeth V Drewry, Michael C Parks, Carol Perruso, Mary E Junck, Michael J Haugh, Judge James R Simpson, Barbara Sample, Gary M Arnold, James D Shaw, Barbara R De Young, Kathryn M Downing, Janette O Payne, Raymond Jansen, Jr., Louis Sito, W Thomas Johnson, Jr, William J Rowe, John Darnall, Martha A Petty, Stender E Sweeney, Rajender K Chandhok, John W Young, Robert N Brisco, Lee J Guittar, Robert M Johnson, Herbert K Schnall, Durham J Monsma, Janie Molvar, Marian Lewis, Leslie M Howard, Stephen C Meier, John F Dill, James E Fitzgerald, Michael R Riley, Sharon S Tunstall, Michael G Rose, Robert E Trainor, William F Keller, Caroline Thorpe, James L Kopper, Victor A Perry, Dian S Carpenter, Kenneth H Brief, Karen Laukka Horn, Edward L Blood, George Bell, Brian J Sellstrom, Peter J Fernald, Mary M Downes, Randolph R Charles, Joseph M Hughes, James F Guthrie, James H Nuckols, Gary P Goldstein, John F Patinella, Grace E Crowder, Jason E Klein, Francis P Pandolfi, Howard S Schneider, Stuart K Coppens, Jeffrey N Paro, Janet T Clayton, et al William A Niese, Kathleen M Casey, William H Barlow, Andrew W Clurman and John S Carroll
Defendant: Prism Partners I, L.P., Prism Partners III Leveraged, L.P., Prism Partners II, L.P., Daryl V Dichek, The Bank of Nova Scotia, American Enterprise Investment Services Inc, T Rowe Price Group Inc, Chandler Trust No 1, Catherine A. Verdusco as trustee U/A Dtd. Francesca J. Verdusco Trust, EB Russell 1000 Value Stock-EB DV Large Cap Value Stock Index, Weintraub Capital Management, L.P., Residuary Trust No 2, May C Goodan Tust No 2, William Stinehart, Jr, Schwab Fundamental US LG CO (2MB1), STRS, Patricia H Yeomans Ttee, Research Affiliates Fundamental Index LP, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, San Francisco City & County Employees' Retirement System, Weintraub Capital Management, Richard and Carol Askin Ttee, MB Financial Bank, N.A., HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, Scott Smith, Max S Bell, Eureka Options LLC, Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2, City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan, City Employee's Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles, Southern California Edison, NDT, Prism Partners II Offshore Fund, William J Bell Ttee, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Wedbush Securities Inc, Dorothy Russell Shattuck, V Trader Pro LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Company-P&G Qual CPUC NDT Partnership, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, Joy Leichenger Ttee, RWB, Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst, Water And Power Employees Ret, CALPERS, First Republic Bank, Does 1 through 2000, Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund (2M37), Roger Goodan, Patricia Crowe Warren Residuary Trust No 2, Rosenberg Revocable Trust, Antoinette B Brumbaugh Ttee UA, Barclays Gbl Investors NA, Sempra Energy Pension Master Trust, Ruth C Von Platen Trust No 2, Leonard F Hill Ttee, University of CA Regents, Samuel Moore Ttee, PG and E Qual Cpuc Ndt Partnership, Timothy R. Kennedy, Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable, Glass Lewis and Co, Prism Partners III Leverage LP, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co, Lucile M Dunn Ttee, Janna L Gadden, Marian Otis Chandler Trust No 2, Garland Foundation Trust No 2, Catholic Health West CHW, The Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University, Catherine A Verdusco Ttee, WG Trading Co LP, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Aviv Nevo, Prism Partners IV Leveraged Offshore Fund, HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, Monumental Life Insurance Co, The Whittier Trust Company, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Prism Partners I, The Spurgeon Family Limited, Iris B Mahoney and Paul M Mahoney Ttees, Chandler Trust No 2, Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd., Irving and Varda Rabin 1992 Revocable Trust, MC Investment Partners LLC, Pacific Select Fund - Equity Index Portfolio, Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl, Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund (2M40), Will K Weinstein Revocable Trust, Earl E Crowe Trust No 2, Philip Chandler, California Ironworkers Field, Everest Re Group Ltd., Herbert G Lau Profit Sharing Qrp Participation, CA Public Employee Retirement System, Re Camden Asset Mgmt LP, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Prism Partners Offshore Fund, Bernard And Barbro Osher, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc., HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, Sacramento Cnty Emp Ret System, Bernard Osher Trust, Reliance Trust Company, Bellsouth Corp Non-Representable Health Care Trust, Reinhold and Shelley Weege Ttee, Jean F Bell, Shirley Dichek Ttee, Nancy Fay Johnson, Synergy Capital Management LLC, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, Harvey Mudd College, Kaiser Fdn Hlth Plans Hospital, Defendants' Executive Committee, Paul M Mahoney Ttee, Stanford University LCV, Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No 2, The Vanguard Group Inc, Jeffrey Chandler, Southern California Edison Company Nuclear Facilities Qualified CPUC Decommissioning Master Trust, B Woods and L Mitchell Ttee, Los Angeles Dept. Of Water And Power Employee RET-T Rowe Price LG VAL - Disability & Death Benefit Insurance Plan, Helen Garland Trust No 2, Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Schwab 1000 Index Fund (2M25), Bechtel, Robert D Friedman Ttee, Verna R Harrah Trust, B4301 First Republic Bank, Cutler Group LP, Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (2M32), Union Bank of California NA and HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Cutler Group, LP, Cassandra Trading Group LLC and Carol E Newman
Case Number: 1:2012cv00554
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441fr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 180 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (8195 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court shall close these cases. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
February 28, 2019 Filing 179 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [6047 in 12-cv-2652-DLC] MOTION for Nicholas M. Kelley to Withdraw as Attorney For Defendant W.L. Putnam Prize Fund. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Nicolas M. Kelley terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7770 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC) Letter filed by Marc S. Kirschner. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 5/15/2020.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(jca)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
February 7, 2019 Filing 177 MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:11-cv-04522-DLC; granting (7746) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Evan Robert Schnittman terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/7/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al. (jca)
January 30, 2019 Filing 176 DECLARATION of Evan Schnittman in Support re: (296 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 233 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03753-DLC, 201 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 122 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 303 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03750-DLC, 6019 in 1:12-cv-02652-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 405 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 259 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 7746 in 1:11-md-02296-DLC, 230 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 298 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 374 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03738-DLC, 121 in 1:12-cv-06055-DLC, 194 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 282 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 211 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 175 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03752-DLC, 259 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 166 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 342 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03747-DLC, 246 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03739-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-03737-DLC, 130 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 149 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 855 in 1:12-cv-00064-DLC, 286 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 678 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 134 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 66 in 1:13-cv-03744-DLC, 61 in 1:13-cv-03743-DLC, 897 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 114 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 208 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 61 in 1:13-cv-03741-DLC, 162 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03748-DLC, 141 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 225 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 120 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03742-DLC, 290 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03749-DLC, 220 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 63 in 1:13-cv-03746-DLC, 298 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 218 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 264 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 186 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03751-DLC, 159 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 129 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 465 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 261 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 163 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 140 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 190 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03745-DLC, 125 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 152 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 386 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 54 in 1:13-cv-03740-DLC, 187 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 59 in 1:13-cv-03736-DLC) MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody.. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 175 MOTION for Evan Schnittman to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant St. Barnabas Hospital & Braker Memorial Home Employees Custody. Document filed by ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
January 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Pretrial Conference held on 1/14/2019. (Court Reporter Kristen Carannante) Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER: A pretrial conference is scheduled for January 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street. The Court has received requests from counsel to participate in the conference by telephone. Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED that any party wishing to be heard at the conference must appear in person. Parties wishing only to listen to the conference by telephone may do so by calling (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 7185839. Overflow seating will be available in Courtroom 12B. Parties may order a transcript of the conference by contacting Southern District Reporters. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(gr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Robert Schnittman on behalf of ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL & BRAKER MEMORIAL HOME EMPLOYEES CUSTODY. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-DLC et al.(Schnittman, Evan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Stephen Leonard Ratner, New Attorney: Alan J. Stone, Address: Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, New York, USA 10005, 212-530-5285. Document filed by SG Americas Securities LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Stone, Alan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 171 MOTION for Matthew J. Latterner to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The Bank of Nova Scotia.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Latterner, Matthew)
September 24, 2018 Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Joseph Stone on behalf of The Bank of Nova Scotia. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Stone, Alan)
June 7, 2018 Filing 169 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Tom Van Arsdel, New Attorney: James Andrew Hinds, Jr. . Document filed by Adaly Opportunity Fund TD Securities Inc. aka JC Clark Adaly Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Hinds, James)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7367 in case 11-md-2296) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCES OF DAVID S. MORDKOFF AND REMOVAL FROM ELECTRONIC SERVICE LIST. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney David Steve Mordkoff terminated.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al. (ras) Modified on 4/25/2018 (ras).
August 1, 2016 Filing 167 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Del Guercio on behalf of Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Del Guercio, Anthony)
August 1, 2016 Filing 166 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Del Guercio on behalf of Everest Re Group Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Del Guercio, Anthony)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER in case 1:11-cv-04522-RJS; granting (6483) Letter Application to Change Attorney Name on Roll. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/6/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al. (ajs)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Alexander R. Bilus for Defendants Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co.; Monumental Life Insurance Co.; The Vanguard Group, Inc.; and Vanguard Group, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/5/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:12-cv-00554-RJS(mro)
November 21, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Todd Steinberg on behalf of Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, The Vanguard Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:12-cv-00554-RJS(Steinberg, Stuart)
November 21, 2014 Filing 162 SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Monica K. Hinman on June 27, 2013 . Document filed by Monika K HinmanFiled In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Martin, Brendon)
September 18, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE of Submission of Letter. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust). (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zensky, David)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SUPPLEMENTAL CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION ANDPROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: Named Defendants Counsel may make any or all of its eleven proposed motions to dismiss, so long as the initial briefs are limited to a combined 250 pages. These initial briefs shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 23, 2014. The response briefs shall also be limited to a combined 250 pages, and shall be submitted no later than Monday, June 23, 2014. The reply briefs, if any, shall be limited to a combined 100 pages, and shall be submitted no later than Thursday, July 3, 2014. Shareholder Liaison Counsel is directed to file its proposed global motion to dismiss Count 1 on behalf of all 5,200 Shareholder Defendants. The initial brief shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 23, 2014, and shall be no longer than 40 pages. The response brief shall be submitted no later than Monday, June 23, 2014, and shall be no longer than 40 pages. The reply brief, if any, shall be submitted no later than Thursday, July 3, 2014, and shall be no longer than 15 pages. ( Motions due by 5/23/2014. Responses due by 6/23/2014. Replies due by 7/3/2014.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 PROTECTIVE ORDER IN AID OF MEDIATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... The Court shall retain jurisdiction to interpret and enforce this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(cd)
March 7, 2014 Filing 157 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jennifer Lynn Zordani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9431269. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cassandra Trading Group LLC, Cutler Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Zordani, Jennifer) Modified on 3/7/2014 (wb).
February 28, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leland H. Chait on behalf of B H Gerald Rogers MD Ltd Employee Pension Trust U/A 07/01/84, B H Gerald Rogers, Trustee, Mary Sutliffe Loucks Trust Portfolio 835, Mary Sutliffe Loucks, Trustee, Ralph Loucks Trust, Ralph B Loucks, Trustee, Robert B Greene Jr Trust U/A 11/06/86, Robert B Greene Jr, Trustee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Chait, Leland)
February 28, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Clorfeine on behalf of Sempra Energy Pension Master Trust, Sempra Energy, Trustee, Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Clorfeine, Sabina)
February 28, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kurt E Wilson on behalf of Warren J. Eide. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Wilson, Kurt)
February 27, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabina Clorfeine on behalf of SDG&E Nuc Facilities NQ CPUC Decom Master Trust For Songs, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Clorfeine, Sabina)
February 27, 2014 Filing 152 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Boos on behalf of Okabena US Core Equity Fund, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Boos, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2014 (lb).
February 27, 2014 Filing 151 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Boos on behalf of David R. Coggins, Jr. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Boos, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2014 (lb).
February 13, 2014 Filing 150 MOTION for Richard J. Leamy, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9354696. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Leamy, Richard)
February 5, 2014 Filing 149 MOTION for Brian E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CATHOLIC UNITED INVESTMENT TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Martin, Brian)
January 29, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Krauss on behalf of American Enterprise Investment Services Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 1:12-cv-02652-RJS(Krauss, Michael)
December 10, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Eric David Madden on behalf of BLACK DIAMOND ARBITRAGE OFFSHORE LTD. F/K/A BLACK DIAMOND ARBITRAGE OFFSHORE LDC, Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore LDC, Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore Ltd., Black Diamond Offshore Ltd., Carlson Capital LP. New Address: Reid Collins & Tsai LLP, 1601 Elm Street, Ste. 4900, Dallas, Texas, USA 75201, 214-420-8900. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Madden, Eric)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting (2945) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott Cameron Kessenick terminated in case 1:11-md-02296-RJS; granting (145) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott Cameron Kessenick terminated in case 1:12-cv-00554-RJS. The Court having considered the motion seeking leave, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, for Scott Cameron Kessenick to withdraw as counsel for the following named Defendants in the above-referenced action: Charles Schwab Inv. Mgt. Co., Monumental Life Insurance Co., The Vanguard Group, Inc, and Vanguard Group, Inc. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/6/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:12-cv-00554-RJS (ja) Modified on 12/10/2013 (ja).
December 5, 2013 Filing 145 MOTION for Scott Cameron Kessenick to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion of Withdraw of Counsel. Document filed by Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, The Vanguard Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc., Vanguard Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:12-cv-00554-RJS(Doluisio, Michael)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MASTER CASE ORDER NO.4: For the purpose of facilitating the efficient administration of these cases, including the preparation of a protocol for the future consideration of additional pre-answer motions to dismiss ("Phase Two Motions"), I and the Court having received submissions from Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel and Defendants' Liaison Counsel (after consultation with their Executive Committees) previously designated herein, it is further set forth within this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(rsh)
November 19, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE. by Joseph F. Kun. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(sc)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Rachel Sims dated 10/15/2013 re: Accordingly, I respectfully request that I be removed from the Court's electronic filing notifications for this action. I have been informed by the court clerk that I am required to make this application by letter to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ama)
October 9, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Douglas J. Smillie, New Attorney: Kevin Kennedy, Address: Blake Kirchner, Symonds Larson, Kennedy and Smith, 535 Griswold, Suite 1432, Detroit, Michigan, USA 48226, 313-961-7321. Document filed by Timothy R. Kennedy. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Smillie, Douglas)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Eugene J. Geekie, Jr. of the law firm of Freeborn & Peters LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendants Charles T. Brumback, Kimberly C. Brumback and Brumback Family, LLC, replacing Jeffrey David Eaton, Susan P. Persichilli and Louis T. DeLucia, of the law firm of Schiff Hardin LLP, who hereby withdraw as counsel of record for the heretofore named Defendants and shall have no further responsibility in this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/07/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ama)
September 27, 2013 Filing 139 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated September 23, 2013, the Court concludes that Section 546(e) does not preempt the Individual Creditors SLCFC claims, but that Section 362(a)(1) nonetheless deprives the Individual Creditors of standing to avoid the same transactions that the Committee is simultaneously suing to avoid; Defendants motion to dismiss is therefore granted; accordingly, the cases listed in Exhibit A of the Memorandum and Order dated September 23, 2013 and this judgment are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/27/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(ml)
August 23, 2013 Filing 138 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
August 23, 2013 Filing 137 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 134 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (2 in 1:13-cv-03738-RJS, 162 in 1:11-cv-09511-RJS, 77 in 1:12-cv-04539-RJS, 133 in 1:12-cv-00554-RJS, 203 in 1:11-cv-09582-RJS, 322 in 1:11-cv-09409-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03741-RJS, 820 in 1:11-cv-04784-RJS, 174 in 1:11-cv-09510-RJS, 345 in 1:11-cv-04522-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03752-RJS, 105 in 1:11-cv-09408-RJS, 351 in 1:12-cv-00061-RJS, 180 in 1:11-cv-09588-RJS, 118 in 1:12-cv-00550-RJS, 123 in 1:12-cv-00062-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09599-RJS, 970 in 1:12-cv-02652-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03742-RJS, 614 in 1:11-cv-09572-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03745-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03753-RJS, 30 in 1:12-cv-06055-RJS, 189 in 1:11-cv-09406-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-09589-RJS, 290 in 1:11-cv-09586-RJS, 214 in 1:11-cv-09592-RJS, 123 in 1:11-cv-09581-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03737-RJS, 103 in 1:11-cv-09585-RJS, 147 in 1:11-cv-04900-RJS, 2646 in 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 126 in 1:11-cv-09597-RJS, 89 in 1:12-cv-00552-RJS, 188 in 1:12-cv-00551-RJS, 257 in 1:11-cv-09568-RJS, 170 in 1:11-cv-09593-RJS, 98 in 1:11-cv-09594-RJS, 769 in 1:12-cv-00064-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03743-RJS, 246 in 1:11-cv-09598-RJS, 115 in 1:11-cv-09591-RJS, 236 in 1:11-cv-09319-RJS, 91 in 1:11-cv-09515-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09584-RJS, 206 in 1:12-cv-00555-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03749-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03751-RJS, 3 in 1:13-cv-03750-RJS, 413 in 1:11-cv-04538-RJS, 255 in 1:11-cv-09571-RJS, 172 in 1:11-cv-09407-RJS, 221 in 1:11-cv-09570-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03748-RJS, 280 in 1:11-cv-09583-RJS, 84 in 1:11-cv-05136-RJS, 143 in 1:11-cv-09512-RJS, 83 in 1:11-cv-09596-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03736-RJS, 243 in 1:12-cv-00065-RJS, 213 in 1:11-cv-09595-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03747-RJS, 249 in 1:12-cv-00063-RJS, 155 in 1:11-cv-09410-RJS, 150 in 1:11-cv-09569-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03739-RJS, 179 in 1:11-cv-09514-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03744-RJS, 86 in 1:11-cv-09587-RJS, 242 in 1:11-cv-09590-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03740-RJS, 110 in 1:11-cv-09600-RJS, 124 in 1:12-cv-00549-RJS, 2 in 1:13-cv-03746-RJS) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 133 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Fourth Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Schedule of Avoidance Actions))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
July 12, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE of Letter. Document filed by Marc S. Kirschner(as Litigation Trustee, Plaintiff with respect to Preserved Causes of Action). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS et al.(Waldman, Michael)
May 23, 2013 Filing 131 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Michael Ahron on behalf of Reliance Trust Company Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:12-cv-00554-RJS(Ahron, Stephen)
May 23, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of Reliance Trust Company Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:12-cv-00554-RJS(Mordkoff, David)
May 23, 2013 Filing 129 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Reliance Financial Corporation for Reliance Trust Company, Reliance Trust Company, Reliance Trust Company. Document filed by Reliance Trust Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:12-cv-00554-RJS(Ratner, Stephen)
May 23, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of Reliance Trust Company Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJS, 1:12-cv-00554-RJS(Ratner, Stephen)
March 27, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge William H. Pauley, III is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(sjo)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER APPROVING PROTOCOL GOVERNING RETENTION AND DISCOVERY OF DOCUMENTS HELD BY COURT-APPOINTED EXAMINER, KENNETH N. KLEE, ESQ. It is ORDERED as follows: The Protocol Governing Retention and Discovery of Documents Held by Court-Appointed Examiner, Kenneth N. Klee, Esq. attached hereto as Exhibit A is APPROVED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(rjm)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' THIRD OMNIBUS MOTION TO ENLARGE THE TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINTS: granting (323) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; granting (391) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; granting (765) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; granting (125) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04900-WHP; granting (69) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-05136-WHP; granting (2166) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting (215) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09319-WHP; granting (170) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09406-WHP; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09407-WHP; granting (291) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; granting (90) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09408-WHP; granting (139) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; granting (159) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09510-WHP; granting (147) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09511-WHP; granting (128) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09512-WHP; granting (164) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09514-WHP; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09515-WHP; granting (232) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09568-WHP; granting (135) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09569-WHP; granting (202) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09570-WHP; granting (579) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; granting (196) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; granting (99) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09591-WHP; granting (132) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; granting (162) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09588-WHP; granting (220) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; granting (95) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09600-WHP; granting (76) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09599-WHP; granting (222) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09598-WHP; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; granting (68) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09596-WHP; granting (197) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; granting (83) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09594-WHP; granting (155) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09587-WHP; granting (259) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; granting (88) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09585-WHP; granting (108) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09581-WHP; granting (188) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09582-WHP; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09584-WHP; granting (241) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; granting (239) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-09571-WHP; granting (328) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00061-WHP; granting (228) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00062-WHP; granting (223) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00065-WHP; granting (706) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; granting (109) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; granting (100) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00550-WHP; granting (165) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00551-WHP; granting (64) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00552-WHP; granting (114) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP; granting (185) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-00555-WHP; granting (755) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-02652-WHP; granting (65) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-04539-WHP; granting (10) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:12-cv-06055-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (82) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (52) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (25) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (13) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (112) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (191) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (110) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (359) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (446) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (81) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (148) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (200) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (40) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (122) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (178) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (42) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting (183) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (57) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (18) Motion for Extension of Time; granting (181) Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [] Motion for Extension of Time; grant
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SCHEDULING ORDER: The oral argument scheduled for March 1, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. on the Phase One Motions to Dismiss and on the Tendering PHONES Holders' Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs is adjourned to April 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (Oral Argument set for 4/26/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III). (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(pl)
February 4, 2013 Filing 123 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (106 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 180 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 94 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 587 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 124 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 102 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 150 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 215 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 219 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 314 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 189 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 64 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 116 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 711 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 63 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 78 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 57 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 103 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 135 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 94 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 146 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 66 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 233 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 157 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 269 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 208 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 122 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 187 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 296 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 1670 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 104 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 218 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 542 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 369 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 206 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 101 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
February 4, 2013 Filing 122 DECLARATION of David C. Bohan in Support re: (106 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 180 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 94 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 587 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 124 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 121 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 102 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 150 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 215 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 219 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 314 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 189 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 64 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 116 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 711 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 63 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 78 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 57 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 103 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 135 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 94 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 146 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 66 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 233 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 85 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 157 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 269 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 208 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 122 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 187 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 296 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 1670 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 104 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 218 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 542 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 369 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 206 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 101 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court having received the attached letter request of Citadel Equity Fund Ltd., Camden Asset Management LP, and certain of their affiliates (collectively, the "Tendering PHONES Holders") to file a motion to intervene as plaintiffs in this multidistrict litigation, dated November 13,2012, the following briefing schedule is entered: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama)
January 18, 2013 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Substitution of Party, Counsel, and Liaison Counsel [Docket No.2179], Notice of Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints [Docket No. 2166], Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion [Docket No.2170], Declaration of David Zensky [Docket No. 2167], Declaration of Jay Teitelbaum, Esq. [Docket No. 2168] and Declaration of James S. Green, Jr. [Docket No. 2169[ on 1/11/13. Service was made by ECF and Mail. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 117 DECLARATION of James S. Green, Jr. in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 10 in 1:12-cv-06055-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 115 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (108 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 223 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 291 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 125 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-04539-WHP, 197 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 188 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 222 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 76 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 100 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 68 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 391 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 2166 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 241 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 765 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 114 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 323 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 99 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 107 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 215 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 220 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 755 in 1:12-cv-02652-WHP, 139 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 162 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 109 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 239 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 232 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 64 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 155 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 111 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 170 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 228 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 328 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 135 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 132 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 164 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 202 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 259 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 185 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 83 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 165 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 706 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 196 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 579 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
January 11, 2013 Filing 114 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Third Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Schedule of Avoidance Actions))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Lack, Robert)
December 26, 2012 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Mike Eugene Abernethy, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(rdz)
December 21, 2012 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 112 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bellsouth Corp Non-Representable Health Care Trust.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Rosenzweig, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 111 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Andrew Rosenzweig on behalf of BellSouth Corporation, Bellsouth Corp Non-Representable Health Care Trust, SBC Master Penson Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Rosenzweig, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Jan Banas, Jr on behalf of Carol E Newman Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Banas, Mitchell)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) and the terms, conditions and limitations of a stipulation between the parties of even date herewith, Plaintiffs William A. Niese et al., hereby dismiss this action without prejudice solely against defendant Glass, Lewis & Co., who has neither moved nor answered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/09/2012) (ama)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY WITHDRAWAL: The following Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily withdraw from the above-referenced cases as Plaintiffs: Durrie Monsma, Peter J. Fernald, Debra A Gastler, Nancy Lobdell, John Patinella and William F. Thomas. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/09/2012) (ama)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1), and for reasons particular to the Retiree Plaintiffs, William A. Niese et al., hereby dismiss this action with prejudice solely against defendants Iris B. Mahoney & Paul M. Mahoney Ttees for Iris B. Mahoney Revocable Trust U/A/D 04/10/98 and Paul M Mahoney Ttee U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978, who have neither moved nor answered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/09/2012) (ama)
November 6, 2012 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) Motion To Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6), And The Exhibit Thereto, And (ii) Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion, And The Exhibit Thereto on 11/6/2012. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (172 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP) MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss The Individual Creditor Actions With Prejudice Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Defendants' Executive Committee. Responses due by 12/21/2012 Return Date set for 3/1/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Steven R. Schoenfeld dated 10/24/2012 re: I request that the Court so order the substitution of Robinson & Cole LLP for Dorsey & Whitney LLP with respect to my role as a member of the Defendants' Executive Committees under Master Case Order No. 3. The enclosed notice of the submission of this letter requesting this change has been sent to all counsel via ECF filing in 12 MC 2296. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/26/2012). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al. Docket entry to be made in 12mc2296, 11md2296 and member cases as per Chambers. (rjm)
October 26, 2012 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shauna R. Prewitt on behalf of Enrique Hernandez, Jr Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(Prewitt, Shauna)
October 26, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Thomas Manning on behalf of Enrique Hernandez, Jr Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(Manning, Jason)
October 26, 2012 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donna L. McDevitt on behalf of Enrique Hernandez, Jr Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(McDevitt, Donna)
October 26, 2012 Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew R. Kipp on behalf of Enrique Hernandez, Jr Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(Kipp, Matthew)
October 15, 2012 Filing 97 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by City Employee's Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan.(D'Agostino, Michael)
October 15, 2012 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of City Employee's Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan, City Employees' Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
September 24, 2012 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Janna L Gadden. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(ft)
September 13, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE of Notice of Filing and Service re: (1395 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1395 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, (1419 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
September 13, 2012 Filing 94 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Pleadings Relating to Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints re: (1370 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), (1364 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints., (1367 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1366 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1365 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (1368 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
September 12, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Paul Knudsen on behalf of Daryl V Dichek (Knudsen, Geoffrey)
September 12, 2012 Filing 92 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Southern California Edison Company Nuclear Facilities Qualified CPUC Decommissioning Master Trust.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Slome, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Richard Slome on behalf of Southern California Edison Company Nuclear Facilities Qualified CPUC Decommissioning Master Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 1:12-cv-02652-WHP(Slome, Thomas)
September 4, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Carbonara on behalf of Ruanwil LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Carbonara, Richard)
September 4, 2012 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Carbonara on behalf of Stanton R. Cook Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Carbonara, Richard)
August 31, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of Notice of Filing and Service of Pleading re: (1364 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints., (1367 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1366 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1365 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, (1368 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
August 30, 2012 Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Second Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time For Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Green, James)
July 25, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Michael Ahron on behalf of Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl (Ahron, Stephen)
July 25, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl (Mordkoff, David)
July 25, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl (Ratner, Stephen)
July 12, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Steve Mordkoff on behalf of PG and E Qual Cpuc Ndt Partnership (Mordkoff, David)
July 12, 2012 Filing 82 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for PG and E Qual Cpuc Ndt Partnership. Document filed by PG and E Qual Cpuc Ndt Partnership.(Ratner, Stephen)
July 12, 2012 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of PG and E Qual Cpuc Ndt Partnership (Ratner, Stephen)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial case management conference having been conducted on July 10, 2012, the following schedule is entered on consent:1. Defendants in the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company, et al v. FitzSimons, et al., 12 Civ 2652 (WHP) (the "Committee Action") are directed to submit a proposed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multi district litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. See Manual for Complex Litig., 10.221 (4th ed. 2004). The proposed organizational structure will be subject to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by August 3, 2012. This Court appoints Grippo & Elden LLC to act as interim liaison counsel for defendants in the Committee Action.2.If defendants in the Committee Action cannot agree on a proposed organizational structure, competing applications for executive committees should be docketed on 12 MC 2296 and all related actions and submitted to chambers no later than August 3, 2012.3. Interim liaison counsel are directed to submit a proposed Master Case Order No. 3 consistent with this Court's directives by August 7, 2012. Where the parties cannot agree, they should submit alternative proposals for the Court's consideration. If necessary, the parties are permitted to submit letter memoranda in support of their respective positions. 4.Plaintiffs are directed to submit a letter memorandum outlining the limited discovery they now wish to pursue by July 26, 2012. Defendants shall submit a letter memorandum in response by August 16, 2012 5.This multi district litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(js)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL:PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the law firm of Entwistle & Cappucci LLP hereby enters its appearance as proposed counsel for defendant Denise Meck, and G. Douglas Kilday and the law firm of Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody hereby withdraw as counsel of record for Denise Meck and shall have no further responsibility in this matter. Denise Meck hereby requests that all pleadings, notices, orders, and other papers given or filed in the above-captioned matter be given and served upon the following person at the address, telephone number, and e- mail address indicated in this order., Attorney G Douglas Kilday terminated. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
June 8, 2012 Filing 78 MOTION for William K. Dodds to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Monumental Life Insurance Co, Vanguard Group Inc.(Dodds, William)
June 5, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 7/10/2012 at 11:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
June 5, 2012 Filing 77 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), William A. Niese et al., hereby dismisses this action solely against defendant Scott Smith, who has neither moved nor answered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(mro) Modified on 6/7/2012 (mro).
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MASTER CASE ORDER No. 2: The Clerk of the Court (the "Clerk") is directed to transfer docket entry ECF No. 692 (Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order) from 11 MD 2296 to the master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296 and number it ECF No. 18 on 12 MC 2296. The Clerk is directed to docket this Master Case Order No. 2 as ECF No. 19 on 12 MC 2296, and docket it on 11 MD 2296 and on all of the consolidated actions. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is directed to add the following plaintiff to the master case file: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. (the "Unsecured Creditors Committee"). Accordingly, the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 should list only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees, and (v) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. Interim Liaison Counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee: This Court appoints Zuckerman Spaeder LLP ("Zuckerman Spaeder") as interim liaison counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee and as further set forth in this order. All pending motions for substitution of counsel are granted. Notwithstanding the stay, parties may make motions to substitute counsel, and all such motions shall be docketed only on 11 MD 2296 and the relevant related actions and shall include a proposed order. Any party submitting a motion for substitution of counsel is directed to send a courtesy copy of the proposed order to chambers. No defendant has opposed Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion is granted. The time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve all summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21) in all actions, and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), is enlarged through and including August 31, 2012, retroactive to March 29, 2012. With respect to defendants who may be added as defendants or changed through amendments in any action on or after March 29, 2012, including defendants within the putative defendant classes who Plaintiffs determine should be individually named, the time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve the summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21), and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), shall expire no earlier than August 31, 2012. This Court will hold an initial pretrial conference with all interim liaison counsel on July 10, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss, inter alia, Defendants' co-interim liaison counsel's proposed organizational structure, a preliminary case management schedule, including a schedule for any motions to dismiss, the continuance of the stay, and any other issues counsel wish to raise. Notwithstanding Bankruptcy Judge Kevin J. Carey's Order Partially Lifting Stay of Adversary Proceedings and State Law Fraudulent Conveyance Actions, dated March 15, 2012, this multidistrict litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
May 23, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jose Guillermo Sepulveda on behalf of TradeStation Securities, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Sepulveda, Jose)
May 4, 2012 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jahan P. Raissi on behalf of Prism Partners I, L.P., Prism Partners III Leveraged, L.P., Prism Partners IV Leveraged Offshore Fund, Weintraub Capital Management, L.P. (Raissi, Jahan)
May 2, 2012 Filing 73 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by First Republic Bank(a California corporation).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(Schneider, Walter)
April 24, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Master Trust Bank of Japan LTD. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Stone, Alan)
April 24, 2012 Filing 71 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, as trustee of Christiana Care Health Services Retirement Plan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 24, 2012 Filing 70 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee of Self-Insurance Reserve Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 24, 2012 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Wilmington Trust Company, as Trustee of Self-Insurance Reserve Fund, Wilmington Trust Company, as trustee of Christiana Care Health Services Retirement Plan Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 19, 2012 Filing 68 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 19, 2012 Filing 67 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 17, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Doluisio on behalf of Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, The Vanguard Group Inc, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc (Doluisio, Michael)
April 17, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund, Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 17, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of The Vanguard Group Inc (Bilus, Alexander)
April 13, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Cameron Kessenick on behalf of Clearwater Growth Fund, John Hancock Financial Services Inc., VFTC-Vanguard Company Stock Markey Account 21, MML Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Retirement Plan Services, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Frank Russell Investments, Frank Russell Trust, Frank Russell, Russell Equity I Fund, Russell Investment Company, Russell Investment Company Diversified Equity Fund, Russell Investment Group, Russell Investments, Russell US Core Equity Fund, HARBOR CAPITAL GROUP TRUST, HARBOR MID CAP VALUE FUND, Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc., Linda Molenda, OptionsXpress, Inc., SBL FUND SERIES H, MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Charles Swab & Co., Inc., Aegon/Transamerica Series Fund - TRP, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Vanguard Asset Allocation Fund, Inc., Vanguard Balanced Index Fund, Inc., Vanguard Equity Income Fund, Inc., Vanguard Fenway Funds, Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, Vanguard Group Inc., Vanguard Group Ltd., Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Fund, Vanguard Malvern Funds, Vanguard Quantitative Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Vanguard Whitehall Funds, Vanguard World Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Walker House SPV Ltd., Caxton Associates LLC, Oppenheimer Main Street Select Fund, Oppenheimer Main Street Small & Mid-Cap Fund, Oppenheimer Variable Account Funds, OppenheimerFunds, Inc., Pro Shares UItra S&P 500, Rydex Investments, Rydex Series Funds Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Rydex Series Funds S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable Trust Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Security Global Investors-Rydex/SGI, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, The Vanguard Group Inc, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Caxton International Limited, Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Kessenick, Scott)
April 13, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Bilus on behalf of Clearwater Growth Fund, John Hancock Financial Services Inc., VFTC-Vanguard Company Stock Markey Account 21, MML Equity Income Fund, T. Rowe Price Retirement Plan Services, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Frank Russell Investments, Frank Russell Trust, Frank Russell, Russell Equity I Fund, Russell Investment Company, Russell Investment Company Diversified Equity Fund, Russell Investment Group, Russell Investments, Russell US Core Equity Fund, HARBOR CAPITAL GROUP TRUST, HARBOR MID CAP VALUE FUND, Harbor Capital Advisors, Inc., Kathleen Maloney, OptionsXpress, Inc., SBL FUND SERIES H, MML Blend Fund, MML Equity Income Fund, Manulife Asset Management (US) LLC, Manulife Invst Ex FDS Corp.-MIX, Manulife U.S. Equity Fund, Massmutual Premier Enhanced Index Value Fund, Massmutual Premier Main Street Small Cap Fund, Massmutual Premier Small Company Opportunities Fund, Massmutual Select Diversified Value Fund, Massmutual Select Indexed Equity Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Charles Swab & Co., Inc., Aegon/Transamerica Series Fund - TRP, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Vanguard Asset Allocation Fund, Inc., Vanguard Balanced Index Fund, Inc., Vanguard Equity Income Fund, Inc., Vanguard Fenway Funds, Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, Vanguard Group Inc., Vanguard Group Ltd., Vanguard Index Funds, Vanguard Institutional Index Fund, Vanguard Malvern Funds, Vanguard Quantitative Funds, Vanguard Valley Forge Funds, Vanguard Whitehall Funds, Vanguard World Fund, Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd./Non-Flip Account C/O Amida Capital Management, LLC, Caxton Associates LP, Clearwater Investment, Walker House SPV Ltd., Caxton Associates LLC, Oppenheimer Main Street Select Fund, Oppenheimer Main Street Small & Mid-Cap Fund, Oppenheimer Variable Account Funds, OppenheimerFunds, Inc., Pro Shares UItra S&P 500, Rydex Investments, Rydex Series Funds Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Rydex Series Funds S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable S&P 500 Pure Value Fund, Rydex Variable Trust Multi-Hedge Strategies Fund, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Monumental Life Insurance Co, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Caxton International Limited, Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Monumental Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bilus, Alexander)
April 4, 2012 Filing 61 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Board of Admistration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, Los Angeles Dept. Of Water And Power Employee RET-T Rowe Price LG VAL - Disability & Death Benefit Insurance Plan, Water And Power Employees Ret.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 60 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by T.Rowe Price Group, Inc., T Rowe Price Group Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of Los Angeles Dept. Of Water And Power Employee RET-T Rowe Price LG VAL - Disability & Death Benefit Insurance Plan, T Rowe Price Group Inc, Water And Power Employees Ret Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(D'Agostino, Michael)
April 4, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary C. Dunn on behalf of Dorothy Russell Shattuck Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Dunn, Mary)
April 4, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of The Spurgeon Family Limited Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(Bohan, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Jay Teitelbaum in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Andrew N. Goldfarb in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 54 DECLARATION of David Zensky in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 158 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 613 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 394 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 30 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 182 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 154 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 95 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 278 in 1:11-cv-04522-WHP, 126 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 167 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 112 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 59 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 186 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 201 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 329 in 1:11-cv-04538-WHP, 65 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 147 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 167 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 39 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 52 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 42 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 82 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 106 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 98 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 128 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 67 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP, 61 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 97 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 224 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 52 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 69 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 125 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 136 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 69 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 127 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 460 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 698 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 114 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 208 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 142 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 47 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 77 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP) MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Senior Notes), Wilmington Trust Company(in its capacity as successor identure trustee for certain series of Phones Notes).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Zensky, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 51 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of Vincent A Badali, The Spurgeon Family Limited Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Bohan, David) Modified on 4/4/2012 (ldi).
March 27, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walter Raymond Schneider on behalf of First Republic Bank (Schneider, Walter)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MASTER CASE ORDER No. 1: In the exercise of its informed discretion, this Court restructures this multidistrict litigation as follows: The Clerk is directed to open a master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296. Any filing fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The Clerk is directed to transfer the following docket entries from 11 MD 2296 to 12 MC 2296: ECF Nos. 1 (Transfer Order), 17 (Master Stay Order), 39 (Pilot Project Removal Order), 41 (Protective Order No.1), 62 (Pro Hac Order), 386 (Status Letter Order), 499 (Notice of Case Reassignment), and 559 (Temporary Stay Order). Those docket entries are to be numbered ECF Nos. 1-8, respectively, on 12 MC 2296. This Order shall be docketed as ECF No. 9 in 12 MC 2296 and docketed on all matters consolidated in 11 MD 2296. This Order and all subsequent docket entries on 12 MC 2296 are to be docketed simultaneously on 11 MD 2296. In addition, each subsequent filing by the parties on 12 MC 2296 or 11 MD 2296 shall indicate whether the filing should be docketed in all related actions or only in specified related actions. Counsel are reminded that filings are to be spread across all related actions only when necessary. Papers filed inappropriately will be stricken from the docket. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is further directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, and (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees. Plaintiffs (i)-(iii) collectively are hereafter referred to as the "Note Holders" and plaintiff (iv) is referred to as the "Retirees." Interim Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs: This Court appoints Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP ("Akin Gump") as interim liaison counsel for the Note Holders and Teitelbaum & Baskin, LLP (the "Teitelbaum Firm") as interim liaison counsel for the Retirees. All counsel for plaintiffs are directed to confer for the purpose of identifying who among them intend to submit motion papers or memoranda to this Court, appear in person for conferences, or offer oral arguments to the Court. Plaintiffs are directed to submit a list to the Court identifying such counsel by March 30, 2012. Interim Lead Defendants: Based on a preliminary review of the complaints in the related actions, this Court endeavored to select interim lead defendants with a sufficient financial interest and who represent different classes of shareholders. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following defendants: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, and Mario J. Gabelli, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders. This Court appoints Proskauer Rose LLP (for The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation), Kaye Scholer, LLP (for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated), and Entwistle & Cappucci LLP (for Mario J. Gabelli) to act as interim co-liaison counsel for defendants. These firms are collectively referred to as "defendants' interim co-liaison counsel." Defendants are directed to submit a proposed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multidistrict litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. The proposed organizational structure will be subject to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by April 20, 2012; as further set forth in this Master Case Order No. 1. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(mro)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: The stay entered in this multi district litigation on December 28, 2012 by Judge Richard J. Holwell (ECF No. 17), and modified by Order dated January 27, 2012 (ECF No. 386), is further modified as follows: No party to this action is permitted to make any motion, file any documents on the docket, or submit any papers to the Clerk's Office or this Court's chambers until further notice from this Court. It is further ordered that all pending motions for admission pro hac vice are denied without prejudice. The Clerk ofthe Court is directed to terminate all pending motions for admission pro hac vice. This Court will establish a procedure for attorneys to appear in this action by subsequent order. Plaintiffs are directed to serve this Order on all Defendants forthwith. This order relates to all pro hac vice motions filed by attorneys in 11-MD-2296 and all related cases, denying (243) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (244) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (245) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (253) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; denying (320) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; denying (81) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (159) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (184) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (185) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (189) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (190) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (191) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (194) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (196) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (203) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (204) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (206) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (217) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (218) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (219) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (222) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (234) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (237) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (258) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (259) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (266) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (267) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (269) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (276) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (279) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (282) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (309) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (311) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (312) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (328) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (332) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (334) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (353) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (354) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (356) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (359) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (361) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (362) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (402) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (405) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (408) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (423) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (440) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (445) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (471) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (474) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (479) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (500) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (503) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (504) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (505) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (506) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (507) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (508) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (510) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (512) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (513) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (514) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (515) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (516) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (517) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (525) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (527) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (533) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (534) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (536) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (539) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (541) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (543) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (548) Motion for Leave to Appear ; denying (552) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (553) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (554) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (555) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (556) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; denying (167) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (193) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (201) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; denying (75) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (76) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; denying (344) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (346) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (352) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (369) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (370) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; denying (126) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; denying (85) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; denying (178) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (179) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (180) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; denying (55) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; denying (108) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; denying (100) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (101) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; denying (140) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (152) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (153) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; denying (137) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; denying (212) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00061-WHP; denying (160) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (161) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (162) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; denying (430) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (431) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; denying (65) Motion for Leave to Appear in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; denying (47) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(ft)
February 14, 2012 Filing 47 MOTION for Christopher T. Heffelfinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by CA Public Employee Retirement System, CALPERS((California Pub Emp Retire Sys)), CALPERS((Dynamic Completion Fund)), University of CA Regents.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 1:12-cv-00554-WHP(sjo)
February 10, 2012 Filing 46 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TradeStation Group, Other Affiliate Monex Group, Inc. for TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Document filed by TradeStation Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(Jackson, Richard)
February 9, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Richard Bryan Jackson to RE-FILE Document (97 in 1:11-cv-09406-WHP, 60 in 1:12-cv-00062-WHP, 54 in 1:11-cv-09408-WHP, 106 in 1:11-cv-09511-WHP, 62 in 1:11-cv-09591-WHP, 120 in 1:11-cv-09588-WHP, 81 in 1:11-cv-09319-WHP, 138 in 1:11-cv-09598-WHP, 71 in 1:11-cv-09581-WHP, 62 in 1:12-cv-00549-WHP, 88 in 1:11-cv-09512-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-09599-WHP, 141 in 1:11-cv-09570-WHP, 191 in 1:11-cv-09409-WHP, 149 in 1:11-cv-09583-WHP, 442 in 1:12-cv-00064-WHP, 157 in 1:12-cv-00063-WHP, 21 in 1:12-cv-00552-WHP, 34 in 1:11-cv-05136-WHP, 210 in 1:12-cv-00061-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09584-WHP, 192 in 1:11-cv-09571-WHP, 75 in 1:11-cv-04900-WHP, 148 in 1:11-cv-09582-WHP, 44 in 1:12-cv-00554-WHP, 58 in 1:11-cv-09597-WHP, 123 in 1:11-cv-09592-WHP, 120 in 1:11-cv-09595-WHP, 99 in 1:12-cv-00551-WHP, 54 in 1:12-cv-00550-WHP, 87 in 1:11-cv-09410-WHP, 33 in 1:11-cv-09596-WHP, 55 in 1:11-cv-09600-WHP, 90 in 1:11-cv-09589-WHP, 45 in 1:11-cv-09594-WHP, 109 in 1:11-cv-09514-WHP, 175 in 1:11-cv-09590-WHP, 375 in 1:11-cv-09572-WHP, 104 in 1:11-cv-09510-WHP, 40 in 1:11-cv-09515-WHP, 53 in 1:11-cv-09585-WHP, 144 in 1:12-cv-00065-WHP, 116 in 1:12-cv-00555-WHP, 169 in 1:11-cv-09586-WHP, 107 in 1:11-cv-09593-WHP, 91 in 1:11-cv-09569-WHP, 159 in 1:11-cv-09568-WHP, 497 in 1:11-md-02296-WHP, 36 in 1:11-cv-09587-WHP, 599 in 1:11-cv-04784-WHP, 51 in 1:11-cv-09407-WHP) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were only added to 11-md-2296. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). NOTE: YOU MUST SELECT THE FILER FOR EACH INDIVIDUAL CASE Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lb)
February 9, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Richard J. Holwell is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(sjo)
February 9, 2012 Filing 44 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TradeStation Group, Other Affiliate Monex Group, Inc. for TradeStation Securities, Inc.. Document filed by TradeStation Securities, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Jackson, Richard) Modified on 2/10/2012 (lb).
February 8, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Anthony C. Valiulis to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. [488 (in 11-md-2296, and all consolidated actions)] Motion Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(db)
February 8, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Shawn M. Staples to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. [487 (11-md-2296, and all consolidated actions)] Motion Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(db)
February 8, 2012 Filing 43 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION of Anthony C. Valiulis for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Valiulis, Anthony) Modified on 2/9/2012 (db).
February 8, 2012 Filing 42 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION of Shawn M. Staples for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Staples, Shawn) Modified on 2/9/2012 (db).
February 7, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Kennedy Dodds on behalf of Monumental Life Insurance Co (Dodds, William)
February 3, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank J Morales on behalf of Automotive Machinists Pension Trust Fund, MICHAEL HENDRICKSON, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry, Michael Parmalee Welfare and Pension Administration Inc Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Morales, Frank)
February 2, 2012 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MB Financial, Inc. for MB Financial Bank, N.A.. Document filed by MB Financial Bank, N.A..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Dahl, James)
January 30, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian J Hurst on behalf of Southwest Securities Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-RJH et al.(Hurst, Brian)
January 30, 2012 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
January 30, 2012 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (sjo)
January 30, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
January 30, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:11-md-02296-RJH. (sjo)
January 30, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-md-02296-RJH. (sjo)
January 30, 2012 Filing 37 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:11-cv-07577. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
January 10, 2012 Filing 36 TRANSMITTAL LETTER - MDL CASE TRANSFER OUT: A certified copy of the MDL 2296 Transfer Order with electronic docket sheet sent to USDC Southern District of New York at New York, New York on 1/10/12. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
January 10, 2012 Filing 35 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by Clerk of Court transferring case to Southern District of New York at New York and assigned to Judge Richard J Holwell, electronic docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
January 3, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Marie G. Quashnock on behalf of Defendants CA Public Employee Retirement System, CALPERS, CALPERS, University of CA Regents. Filed by Defendants CA Public Employee Retirement System, CALPERS, CALPERS, University of CA Regents (Quashnock, Marie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
January 3, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Christopher T. Heffelfinger on behalf of Defendants CA Public Employee Retirement System, CALPERS, CALPERS, University of CA Regents. Filed by Defendants CA Public Employee Retirement System, CALPERS, CALPERS, University of CA Regents (Heffelfinger, Christopher) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
January 3, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Joseph J Tabacco, Jr counsel for Defendants CA Public Employee Retirement System, CALPERS, CALPERS, University of CA Regents. Adding Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr. as attorney as counsel of record for California Public Employees' Retirement System; CALPERS (Dynamic Completion Fund); CALPERS (California Pub Emp Retire Sys); and The Regents of the University of California for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant California Public Employees' Retirement System; CALPERS (Dynamic Completion Fund); CALPERS (California Pub Emp Retire Sys); and The Regents of the University of California (Tabacco, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
December 29, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen J Newman on behalf of Defendant Sacramento Cnty Emp Ret System (Newman, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
December 27, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stuart Libicki on behalf of Defendant California Ironworkers Field (Libicki, Stuart) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
December 21, 2011 21 DAY Summons Issued re Seconc Amended Complaint #29 as to Defendants Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No 2, American Enterprise Investment Services Inc, Antoinette B Brumbaugh Ttee UA, B Woods and L Mitchell Ttee, B4301 First Republic Bank, Barclays Gbl Investors NA, Bechtel, Jean F Bell, Max S Bell, Bellsouth Corp Non-Representable Health Care Trust, Bernard And Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable, Bernard Osher Trust, CA Public Employee Retirement System, CALPERS((Dynamic Completion Fund)), CALPERS((California Pub Emp Retire Sys)), California Ironworkers Field, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Catherine A Verdusco Ttee, Catherine A. Verdusco as trustee U/A Dtd. 12/13/1989 Francesca J. Verdusco Trust, Catholic Health West Chw, Jeffrey Chandler, Philip Chandler, Chandler Trust No 1, Chandler Trust No 2, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, City Employee's Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan, Cutler Group LP, Daryl V Dichek, Does, Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No 2, EB Russell 1000 Value Stock-EB DV Large Cap Value Stock Index, Earl E Crowe Trust No 2, Eureka Options LLC, First Republic Bank, Janna L Gadden, Garland Foundation Trust No 2, Glass Lewis and Co, Roger Goodan, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, Harvey Mudd College, Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Gwendolyn Garland Babcock)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Hillary Duque Garland)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For William M Garland III)), Herbert G Lau Profit Sharing Qrp Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Iris B Mahoney and Paul M Mahoney Ttees, Irving and Varda Rabin 1992 Revocable Trust, Nancy Fay Johnson, Joy Leichenger Ttee, Kaiser Fdn Hlth Plans Hospital, Leonard F Hill Ttee, Los Angeles Dept. Of Water And Power Employee RET-T Rowe Price LG VAL - Disability & Death Benefit Insurance Plan, Lucile M Dunn Ttee, MC Investment Partners LLC, Marian Otis Chandler Trust No 2, May C Goodan Tust No 2, Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl, Monumental Life Insurance Co, Aviv Nevo, PG and E Qual Cpuc Ndt Partnership, Pacific Gas & Electric Company-P&G Qual CPUC NDT Partnership, Pacific Select Fund - Equity Index Portfolio, Patricia Crowe Warren Residuary Trust No 2, Patricia H Yeomans Ttee, Paul M Mahoney Ttee, Prism Partners I, L.P., Prism Partners II Offshore Fund, Prism Partners II, L.P., Prism Partners III Leveraged, L.P., Prism Partners IV Leveraged Offshore Fund, Prism Partners Offshore Fund, RWB, Re Camden Asset Mgmt LP, Reinhold and Shelley Weege Ttee, Reliance Trust Company, Research Affiliates Fundamental Index LP, Residuary Trust No 2, Richard and Carol Askin Ttee, Robert D Friedman Ttee, Rosenberg Revocable Trust, Ruth C Von Platen Trust No 2, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, STRS, Sacramento Cnty Emp Ret System, Samuel Moore Ttee, San Francisco City & County Employees' Retirement System, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co, Schwab 1000 Index Fund (2M25), Schwab Fundamental US LG CO (2MB1), Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund (2M37), Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (2M32), Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund (2M40), Sempra Energy Pension Master Trust, Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst, Shirley Dichek Ttee, Scott Smith, Southern California Edison, NDT, Stanford University LCV, William Stinehart, Jr, Synergy Capital Management Llc, T Rowe Price Group Inc, The Bank of Nova Scotia, The Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University, The Spurgeon Family Limited, The Vanguard Group Inc, The Whittier Trust Company, Union Bank of California NA, University of CA Regents, V Trader Pro LLC, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Verna R Harrah Trust, WG Trading Co LP, Water And Power Employees Ret, Wedbush Securities Inc, Weintraub Capital Management, Will K Weinstein Revocable Trust, William J Bell Ttee. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
December 21, 2011 Filing 29 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No 2, American Enterprise Investment Services Inc, Antoinette B Brumbaugh Ttee UA, B Woods and L Mitchell Ttee, B4301 First Republic Bank, Barclays Gbl Investors NA, Bechtel, Jean F Bell, Max S Bell, Bellsouth Corp Non-Representable Health Care Trust, Bernard And Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable, Bernard Osher Trust, CA Public Employee Retirement System, CALPERS((Dynamic Completion Fund)), CALPERS((California Pub Emp Retire Sys)), California Ironworkers Field, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Catherine A Verdusco Ttee, Catherine A. Verdusco as trustee U/A Dtd. 12/13/1989 Francesca J. Verdusco Trust, Catholic Health West Chw, Jeffrey Chandler, Philip Chandler, Chandler Trust No 1, Chandler Trust No 2, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, City Employee's Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan, Cutler Group LP, Daryl V Dichek, Does, Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No 2, EB Russell 1000 Value Stock-EB DV Large Cap Value Stock Index, Earl E Crowe Trust No 2, Eureka Options LLC, First Republic Bank, Janna L Gadden, Garland Foundation Trust No 2, Glass Lewis and Co, Roger Goodan, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, Harvey Mudd College, Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Gwendolyn Garland Babcock)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Hillary Duque Garland)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For William M Garland III)), Herbert G Lau Profit Sharing Qrp Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Iris B Mahoney and Paul M Mahoney Ttees, Irving and Varda Rabin 1992 Revocable Trust, Nancy Fay Johnson, Joy Leichenger Ttee, Kaiser Fdn Hlth Plans Hospital, Leonard F Hill Ttee, Los Angeles Dept. Of Water And Power Employee RET-T Rowe Price LG VAL - Disability & Death Benefit Insurance Plan, Lucile M Dunn Ttee, MC Investment Partners LLC, Marian Otis Chandler Trust No 2, May C Goodan Tust No 2, Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl, Monumental Life Insurance Co, Aviv Nevo, PG and E Qual Cpuc Ndt Partnership, Pacific Gas & Electric Company-P&G Qual CPUC NDT Partnership, Pacific Select Fund - Equity Index Portfolio, Patricia Crowe Warren Residuary Trust No 2, Patricia H Yeomans Ttee, Paul M Mahoney Ttee, Prism Partners I, L.P., Prism Partners II Offshore Fund, Prism Partners II, L.P., Prism Partners III Leveraged, L.P., Prism Partners IV Leveraged Offshore Fund, Prism Partners Offshore Fund, RWB, Re Camden Asset Mgmt LP, Reinhold and Shelley Weege Ttee, Reliance Trust Company, Research Affiliates Fundamental Index LP, Residuary Trust No 2, Richard and Carol Askin Ttee, Robert D Friedman Ttee, Rosenberg Revocable Trust, Ruth C Von Platen Trust No 2, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, STRS, Sacramento Cnty Emp Ret System, Samuel Moore Ttee, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co, San Francisco City & County Employees' Retirement System, Schwab 1000 Index Fund (2M25), Schwab Fundamental US LG CO (2MB1), Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund (2M37), Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (2M32), Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund (2M40), Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst, Sempra Energy Pension Master Trust, Shirley Dichek Ttee, Scott Smith, Southern California Edison, NDT, Stanford University LCV, William Stinehart, Jr, Synergy Capital Management Llc, T Rowe Price Group Inc, The Bank of Nova Scotia, The Spurgeon Family Limited, The Vanguard Group Inc, The Whittier Trust Company, The Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University, Union Bank of California NA, University of CA Regents, V Trader Pro LLC, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Verna R Harrah Trust, WG Trading Co LP, Water And Power Employees Ret, Wedbush Securities Inc, Weintraub Capital Management, Will K Weinstein Revocable Trust, William J Bell Ttee amending Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #25 ,filed by plaintiffs Fred A Abatemarco, Gerald J Alcantar, Richard S Alfano, C Michael Armstrong, Gary M Arnold, John M Arthur, William H Barlow, David S Barrett, Bruce E Barwick, Todd A Becker, George Bell, Susan P Bell, Horst A Bergmann, Edward L Blood, Sharon M Bowen, Gregory L Bowlin, Robert F Brandt, Alan L Brauer, Leo Brennan, Kenneth H Brief, Robert N Brisco, Patricia G Campbell, Dian S Carpenter, John S Carroll, Kathleen M Casey, Rajender K Chandhok, Randolph R Charles, Janet T Clayton, Patrick A Clifford, Andrew W Clurman, C Shelby Coffey, III, James Willard Colston, Stuart K Coppens, George J Cotliar, William D Crawford, Grace E Crowder, John Darnall, Kenneth G Davis, Barbara R De Young, John F Dill, Ann E Dilworth, Mary M Downes, Kathryn M Downing, Beverly Dreher, Elizabeth V Drewry, Michael S Dubester, John M Dyer, Paul H Egan, Robert F Erburu, David A Esgro, Joanne K Falk, Peter J Fernald, James E Fitzgerald, Michael J Forgione, Donald H Forst, Douglas Fox, Vance I Furukawa, Debra A Gastler, Gary P Goldstein, Edward J Gottsman, Robert T Grant, Richard Guerrero, Lee J Guittar, James F Guthrie, Delynn T Gutiry, Kenneth L Halajian, Charlotte H Hall, Jean Halle, Michael J Haugh, Janis Heaphy, James D Helin, Curtis A Hessler, James H Higby, Lawrence M Higby, Raymond Holton, Karen Laukka Horn, Leslie M Howard, Mark E Howe, Joseph M Hughes, Alberto Ibarguen, James Imbriaco, Steven L Isenberg, William R Isinger, Raymond Jansen, Jr, Edward E Johnson, Robert M Johnson, W Thomas Johnson, Jr, Mary E Junck, Scott W Kabak, Judith S Kallet, William F Keller, Joan Kellermann, Victoria King, Jason E Klein, Jeffrey S Klein, Arnold J Kleiner, Susan K Klutnick, James L Kopper, Sally Kuekes, Mark H Kurtich, Kimberly McCleary LaFrance, Jeffrey W Lankey, David A Laventhol, Martin P Levin, Jesse E Levine, Marian Lewis, Nancy Lobdell, Robert G Magnuson, Anthony J Marro, Donald S Maxwell, Kathleen G McGuinness, John C McKeon, Jack E Meadows, Stephen C Meier, Janie Molvar, Roger H Molvar, Durham J Monsma, John R Murphy, John T Nash, William A Niese, Nicholas H Niles, James H Norris, James H Nuckols, Nancy W O Neill, Robert T O Sullivan, Francis P Pandolfi, Michael C Parks, Jeffrey N Paro, John F Patinella, Janette O Payne, Carol Perruso, Victor A Perry, Maureen G Peterson, Martha A Petty, Jack L Plank, Elizabeth F Redmond, S Keating Rhoads, Michael R Riley, Michael G Rose, William J Rowe, Jerome S Rubin, Barbara Sample, Alexander Sann, Geraldine Scally, Richard T Schlosberg, III, Herbert K Schnall, Charles I Schneider, Hilary A Schneider, Howard S Schneider, R Marilyn Lee Schneider, Brian J Sellstrom, Carolyn Selzer, James D Shaw, Dennis A Shirley, Gary K Shorts, James R Simpson, Louis Sito, Richard W Stanton, Judith L Sweeney, Stender E Sweeney, William F Thomas, Caroline Thorpe, James S Toedtman, Robert E Trainor, Sharon S Tunstall, Michael S Udovic, Michael J Valenti, Herbert J Vida, Karen J Wada, Claudia A Wade, James W Wallace, Michael E Waller, Larry W Wangberg, Howard Weinstein, William D Wiegand, Mary A Wild, Mark H Willes, Phillip L Williams, Hazel E Wilson, Julia C Wilson, Harold F Woldt, Jr, Leo Wolinsky, Donald F Wright, John W Young, John J Zakarian, Norene Zapanta, Efrem Zimbalist, III (bm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2011: #1 Summons on Second Amended Complaint) (bm). [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Filing 28 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl, identifying The Bank of New York Mellon. (Firestein, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Allen Firestein on behalf of Defendant Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl (Firestein, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDING by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and; These proceedings, including the filing of any answers, motions or discovery requests, are hereby stayed until further order of this Court. re: granting #13 Motion to Stay Case, Nov. 28 hrg vacated. (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) (lw) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
November 4, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Stay Case pending Order of Court Lifting Stay #13 Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay Proceedings Including Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendants Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Jeffrey Chandler, Philip Chandler, Chandler Trust No 1, Chandler Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No 2, Earl E Crowe Trust No 2, Garland Foundation Trust No 2, Roger Goodan, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, Helen Garland Trust No 2, Helen Garland Trust No 2, Helen Garland Trust No 2, Marian Otis Chandler Trust No 2, May C Goodan Tust No 2, Patricia Crowe Warren Residuary Trust No 2, Residuary Trust No 2, Ruth C Von Platen Trust No 2, William Stinehart, Jr. (Feuer, Joel) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
November 2, 2011 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint, #25 as to Defendants Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No 2, American Enterprise Investment Services Inc, Antoinette B Brumbaugh Ttee UA, B Woods and L Mitchell Ttee, Barclays Gbl Investors NA, Jean F Bell, Max S Bell, Bellsouth Corp Non-Representable Health Care Trust, Bernard And Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable, Bernard Osher Trust, CA Public Employee Retirement System, CALPERS((Dynamic Completion Fund)), CALPERS((California Pub Emp Retire Sys)), California Ironworkers Field, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Catherine A Verdusco Ttee, Catherine A. Verdusco as trustee U/A Dtd. 12/13/1989 Francesca J. Verdusco Trust, Catholic Health West Chw, Jeffrey Chandler, Philip Chandler, Chandler Trust No 1, Chandler Trust No 2, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Cutler Group LP, Daryl V Dichek, Does, Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No 2, Earl E Crowe Trust No 2, Eureka Options LLC, First Republic Bank, Janna L Gadden, Garland Foundation Trust No 2, Glass Lewis and Co, Roger Goodan, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Gwendolyn Garland Babcock)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Hillary Duque Garland)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For William M Garland III)), Herbert G Lau Profit Sharing Qrp Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Iris B Mahoney and Paul M Mahoney Ttees, Irving and Varda Rabin 1992 Revocable Trust, Nancy Fay Johnson, Joy Leichenger Ttee, Kaiser Fdn Hlth Plans Hospital, Leonard F Hill Ttee, Lucile M Dunn Ttee, Marian Otis Chandler Trust No 2, May C Goodan Tust No 2, Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl, Monumental Life Insurance Co, Aviv Nevo, PG and E Qual Cpuc Ndt Partnership, Patricia Crowe Warren Residuary Trust No 2, Patricia H Yeomans Ttee, Paul M Mahoney Ttee, Prism Partners I, L.P., Prism Partners II Offshore Fund, Prism Partners II, L.P., Prism Partners III Leveraged, L.P., Prism Partners IV Leveraged Offshore Fund, Prism Partners Offshore Fund, RWB, Re Camden Asset Mgmt LP, Reinhold and Shelley Weege Ttee, Reliance Trust Company, Residuary Trust No 2, Richard and Carol Askin Ttee, Robert D Friedman Ttee, Rosenberg Revocable Trust, Ruth C Von Platen Trust No 2, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, STRS, Sacramento Cnty Emp Ret System, Samuel Moore Ttee, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co, Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst, Shirley Dichek Ttee, Scott Smith, Stanford University LCV, William Stinehart, Jr, Synergy Capital Management Llc, T Rowe Price Group Inc, The Bank of Nova Scotia, The Spurgeon Family Limited, The Vanguard Group Inc, The Whittier Trust Company, Union Bank of California NA, University of CA Regents, V Trader Pro LLC, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Verna R Harrah Trust, WG Trading Co LP, Water And Power Employees Ret, Wedbush Securities Inc, Weintraub Capital Management, Will K Weinstein Revocable Trust, William J Bell Ttee. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
November 2, 2011 Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No 2, American Enterprise Investment Services Inc, Antoinette B Brumbaugh Ttee UA, B Woods and L Mitchell Ttee, Barclays Gbl Investors NA, Bechtel, Jean F Bell, Max S Bell, Bellsouth Corp Non-Representable Health Care Trust, Bernard And Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable, Bernard Osher Trust, CA Public Employee Retirement System, CALPERS((Dynamic Completion Fund)), CALPERS((California Pub Emp Retire Sys)), California Ironworkers Field, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Catherine A Verdusco Ttee, Catherine A. Verdusco as trustee U/A Dtd. 12/13/1989 Francesca J. Verdusco Trust, Catholic Health West Chw, Jeffrey Chandler, Philip Chandler, Chandler Trust No 1, Chandler Trust No 2, Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co, Cutler Group LP, Daryl V Dichek, Does, Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No 2, Earl E Crowe Trust No 2, Eureka Options LLC, First Republic Bank, Janna L Gadden, Garland Foundation Trust No 2, Glass Lewis and Co, Roger Goodan, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Gwendolyn Garland Babcock)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Hillary Duque Garland)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For William M Garland III)), Herbert G Lau Profit Sharing Qrp Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Iris B Mahoney and Paul M Mahoney Ttees, Irving and Varda Rabin 1992 Revocable Trust, Nancy Fay Johnson, Joy Leichenger Ttee, Kaiser Fdn Hlth Plans Hospital, Leonard F Hill Ttee, Lucile M Dunn Ttee, Marian Otis Chandler Trust No 2, May C Goodan Tust No 2, Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl, Monumental Life Insurance Co, Aviv Nevo, PG and E Qual Cpuc Ndt Partnership, Patricia Crowe Warren Residuary Trust No 2, Patricia H Yeomans Ttee, Paul M Mahoney Ttee, Prism Partners I, L.P., Prism Partners III Leveraged, L.P., Prism Partners II Offshore Fund, Prism Partners II, L.P., Prism Partners IV Leveraged Offshore Fund, Prism Partners Offshore Fund, RWB, Re Camden Asset Mgmt LP, Reinhold and Shelley Weege Ttee, Reliance Trust Company, Residuary Trust No 2, Richard and Carol Askin Ttee, Robert D Friedman Ttee, Rosenberg Revocable Trust, Ruth C Von Platen Trust No 2, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, STRS, Sacramento Cnty Emp Ret System, Samuel Moore Ttee, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co, Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst, Shirley Dichek Ttee, Scott Smith, Stanford University LCV, William Stinehart, Jr, Synergy Capital Management Llc, T Rowe Price Group Inc, The Bank of Nova Scotia, The Spurgeon Family Limited, The Vanguard Group Inc, The Whittier Trust Company, Union Bank of California NA, University of CA Regents, V Trader Pro LLC, Vanguard Financial Group Inc, Vanguard Group Inc, Verna R Harrah Trust, WG Trading Co LP, Water And Power Employees Ret, Wedbush Securities Inc, Weintraub Capital Management, Will K Weinstein Revocable Trust, William J Bell Ttee amending Notice of Removal #1 , filed by plaintiffs Fred A Abatemarco, Gerald J Alcantar, Richard S Alfano, C Michael Armstrong, Gary M Arnold, John M Arthur, William H Barlow, David S Barrett, Bruce E Barwick, Todd A Becker, George Bell, Susan P Bell, Horst A Bergmann, Edward L Blood, Sharon M Bowen, Gregory L Bowlin, Robert F Brandt, Alan L Brauer, Leo Brennan, Kenneth H Brief, Robert N Brisco, Patricia G Campbell, Dian S Carpenter, John S Carroll, Kathleen M Casey, Rajender K Chandhok, Randolph R Charles, Janet T Clayton, Patrick A Clifford, Andrew W Clurman, C Shelby Coffey, III, James Willard Colston, Stuart K Coppens, George J Cotliar, William D Crawford, Grace E Crowder, John Darnall, Kenneth G Davis, Barbara R De Young, John F Dill, Ann E Dilworth, Mary M Downes, Kathryn M Downing, Beverly Dreher, Elizabeth V Drewry, Michael S Dubester, John M Dyer, Paul H Egan, Robert F Erburu, David A Esgro, Joanne K Falk, Peter J Fernald, James E Fitzgerald, Michael J Forgione, Donald H Forst, Douglas Fox, Vance I Furukawa, Debra A Gastler, Gary P Goldstein, Edward J Gottsman, Robert T Grant, Richard Guerrero, Lee J Guittar, James F Guthrie, Delynn T Gutiry, Kenneth L Halajian, Charlotte H Hall, Jean Halle, Michael J Haugh, Janis Heaphy, James D Helin, Curtis A Hessler, James H Higby, Lawrence M Higby, Raymond Holton, Karen Laukka Horn, Leslie M Howard, Mark E Howe, Joseph M Hughes, Alberto Ibarguen, James Imbriaco, Steven L Isenberg, William R Isinger, Raymond Jansen, Jr, Edward E Johnson, Robert M Johnson, W Thomas Johnson, Jr, Mary E Junck, Scott W Kabak, Judith S Kallet, William F Keller, Joan Kellermann, Victoria King, Jason E Klein, Jeffrey S Klein, Arnold J Kleiner, Susan K Klutnick, James L Kopper, Sally Kuekes, Mark H Kurtich, Kimberly McCleary LaFrance, Jeffrey W Lankey, David A Laventhol, Martin P Levin, Jesse E Levine, Marian Lewis, Nancy Lobdell, Robert G Magnuson, Anthony J Marro, Donald S Maxwell, Kathleen G McGuinness, John C McKeon, Jack E Meadows, Stephen C Meier, Janie Molvar, Roger H Molvar, Durham J Monsma, John R Murphy, John T Nash, William A Niese, Nicholas H Niles, James H Norris, James H Nuckols, Nancy W O Neill, Robert T O Sullivan, Francis P Pandolfi, Michael C Parks, Jeffrey N Paro, John F Patinella, Janette O Payne, Carol Perruso, Victor A Perry, Maureen G Peterson, Martha A Petty, Jack L Plank, Elizabeth F Redmond, S Keating Rhoads, Michael R Riley, Michael G Rose, William J Rowe, Jerome S Rubin, Barbara Sample, Alexander Sann, Geraldine Scally, Richard T Schlosberg, III, Herbert K Schnall, Charles I Schneider, Hilary A Schneider, Howard S Schneider, R Marilyn Lee Schneider, Brian J Sellstrom, Carolyn Selzer, James D Shaw, Dennis A Shirley, Gary K Shorts, James R Simpson, Louis Sito, Richard W Stanton, Judith L Sweeney, Stender E Sweeney, William F Thomas, Caroline Thorpe, James S Toedtman, Robert E Trainor, Sharon S Tunstall, Michael S Udovic, Michael J Valenti, Herbert J Vida, Karen J Wada, Claudia A Wade, James W Wallace, Michael E Waller, Larry W Wangberg, Howard Weinstein, William D Wiegand, Mary A Wild, Mark H Willes, Phillip L Williams, Hazel E Wilson, Julia C Wilson, Harold F Woldt, Jr, Leo Wolinsky, Donald F Wright, John W Young, John J Zakarian, Norene Zapanta, Efrem Zimbalist, III (bm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2011: #1 Summons on First Amended Complaint) (bm). [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, ORDERING Declaration of Stephen J. Cirami Regarding Mailing of Service Documents submitted by Plaintiffs Fred A Abatemarco, Gerald J Alcantar, Richard S Alfano, C Michael Armstrong received on 10/27/2011 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Document is to be E-Filed. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stephen J. Cirami) (lw) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 27, 2011 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Stephen Cirami of Service of Summons filed by Plaintiff William A Niese. (Judd, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #18 , for the following reasons: Attachment should not have been submitted with Notice of Manual filing, but rather filed at the Civil Intake window. (ir) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 26, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff William A Niese of Declaration of Service of Summons. (Judd, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 25, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #18 . The following error was found: Document submitting manual does not have to be attached to Notice of Manual filing. Manual document shall be filed in at the Civil Intake window. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 24, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff William A Niese of Declaration of Service of Summons. (Judd, Jeffrey) *STRICKEN PURSUAN TO ORDER FILED 10/27/11**Modified on 10/27/2011 (ir). [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #15 , for the following reasons: Case number is incorrect or missing. The attachment entitled "Declaration" should include a title page and be e-filed. Refer to the Court's web site under Civil Forms. (ir) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Manual Filing, Attachment: Declaration #15 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect - Correct case number is: CV 11-7577 PSG (PLAx). Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: The above document's attachment entitled, "Declaration of Service", with the proper title page, should be manually filed at Civil Intake at the Clerk's Office. Please review General Order 10-07 regarding manually filing documents. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lw) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 19, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff William A Niese of Declaration of Service of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service of Summons)(Judd, Jeffrey) **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 10/21/11**Modified on 10/24/2011 (ir). [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 17, 2011 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff William A Niese, re MOTION to Stay Case pending Order of Court Lifting Stay #13 Mtn/Notice of Mtn, Memo of Law ISO Mtn, Teitelbaum Decl. ISO Mtn, Proposed Order Granting Mtn served on 10/17/2011. (Judd, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 14, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Order of Court Lifting Stay filed by Lead plaintiff William A Niese. Motion set for hearing on 11/28/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Proceeding, #2 Declaration of Jay Teitelbaum ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Proceeding, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Proceeding)(Judd, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 12, 2011 Filing 11 Plaintiffs' Response to Removal of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sections 1441, 1446 & 1452 filed by Plaintiffs Fred A Abatemarco, Gerald J Alcantar, Richard S Alfano, C Michael Armstrong, Gary M Arnold, John M Arthur, William H Barlow, David S Barrett, Bruce E Barwick, Todd A Becker, George Bell, Susan P Bell, Horst A Bergmann, Edward L Blood, Sharon M Bowen, Gregory L Bowlin, Robert F Brandt, Alan L Brauer, Leo Brennan, Kenneth H Brief, Robert N Brisco, Patricia G Campbell, Dian S Carpenter, John S Carroll, Kathleen M Casey, Rajender K Chandhok, Randolph R Charles, Janet T Clayton, Patrick A Clifford, Andrew W Clurman, C Shelby Coffey, III, James Willard Colston, Stuart K Coppens, George J Cotliar, William D Crawford, Grace E Crowder, John Darnall, Kenneth G Davis, Barbara R De Young, John F Dill, Ann E Dilworth, Mary M Downes, Kathryn M Downing, Beverly Dreher, Elizabeth V Drewry, Michael S Dubester, John M Dyer, Paul H Egan, Robert F Erburu, David A Esgro, Joanne K Falk, Peter J Fernald, James E Fitzgerald, Michael J Forgione, Donald H Forst, Douglas Fox, Vance I Furukawa, Debra A Gastler, Gary P Goldstein, Edward J Gottsman, Robert T Grant, Richard Guerrero, Lee J Guittar, James F Guthrie, Delynn T Gutiry, Kenneth L Halajian, Charlotte H Hall, Jean Halle, Michael J Haugh, Janis Heaphy, James D Helin, Curtis A Hessler, James H Higby, Lawrence M Higby, Raymond Holton, Karen Laukka Horn, Leslie M Howard, Mark E Howe, Joseph M Hughes, Alberto Ibarguen, James Imbriaco, Steven L Isenberg, William R Isinger, Raymond Jansen, Jr, Edward E Johnson, Robert M Johnson, W Thomas Johnson, Jr, Mary E Junck, Scott W Kabak, Judith S Kallet, William F Keller, Joan Kellermann, Victoria King, Jason E Klein, Jeffrey S Klein, Arnold J Kleiner, Susan K Klutnick, James L Kopper, Sally Kuekes, Mark H Kurtich, Kimberly McCleary LaFrance, Jeffrey W Lankey, David A Laventhol, Martin P Levin, Jesse E Levine, Marian Lewis, Nancy Lobdell, Robert G Magnuson, Anthony J Marro, Donald S Maxwell, Kathleen G McGuinness, John C McKeon, Jack E Meadows, Stephen C Meier, Janie Molvar, Roger H Molvar, Durham J Monsma, John R Murphy, John T Nash, William A Niese, Nicholas H Niles, James H Norris, James H Nuckols, Nancy W O Neill, Robert T O Sullivan, Francis P Pandolfi, Michael C Parks, Jeffrey N Paro, John F Patinella, Janette O Payne, Carol Perruso, Victor A Perry, Maureen G Peterson, Martha A Petty, Jack L Plank, Elizabeth F Redmond, S Keating Rhoads, Michael R Riley, Michael G Rose, William J Rowe, Jerome S Rubin, Barbara Sample, Alexander Sann, Geraldine Scally, Richard T Schlosberg, III, Herbert K Schnall, Charles I Schneider, Hilary A Schneider, Howard S Schneider, R Marilyn Lee Schneider, Brian J Sellstrom, Carolyn Selzer, James D Shaw, Dennis A Shirley, Gary K Shorts, James R Simpson, Louis Sito, Richard W Stanton, Judith L Sweeney, Stender E Sweeney, William F Thomas, Caroline Thorpe, James S Toedtman, Robert E Trainor, Sharon S Tunstall, Michael S Udovic, Michael J Valenti, Herbert J Vida, Karen J Wada, Claudia A Wade, James W Wallace, Michael E Waller, Larry W Wangberg, Howard Weinstein, William D Wiegand, Mary A Wild, Mark H Willes, Phillip L Williams, Hazel E Wilson, Julia C Wilson, Harold F Woldt, Jr, Leo Wolinsky, Donald F Wright, John W Young, John J Zakarian, Norene Zapanta, Efrem Zimbalist, III (Judd, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jay Teitelbaum on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Jeffrey M. Judd as local counsel. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for attorney Jay Teitelbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-9321536 paid.) filed by et al., plaintiffs William A Niese. (Judd, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, pursuant to Stipulation #6 . Plaintiffs intend to file a motion to stay all proceedings pending further orders by the Tribune Bankruptcy Court to lift the automatic stay in the Tribune Bankruptcy Case and permit Plaintiffs to move forward with this action before this Court and the other three actions. The Chandler Defendants' time to respond to theComplaint is extended until the Court rules on the motion to stay. If the Court grants the motion, then the Chandler Defendants' time to respond wil be governed by the order subject to Paragraph 2. If the Court denies the motion, then the Chandler Defendants' will have 30 days to respond following the issuance of such an order, subject to Paragraph 2. 2. The Chandler Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint is further extended until 30 days after an Order issued by the MDL Panel on the MDL Motion or any such other date as may be agreed upon. 3. The Parties agree that if this action is transferred as part of an order granting the MDL Motion or if it is otherwise transferred to the transferee court designated by the MDL Panel as a "tag-along" action, then nothing herein will prevent the Chandler Defendants from seeking a further continuance in order to coordinate their response to the Complaint with the defendants in the other actions. (ir) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
September 23, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of (1) Interested Party Response and (2) Notice of Related Action in Pending MDL #2296 filed by lead plaintiff William A Niese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Notice of Filing of Interested Party Response and Notice of Related Action in pending MDL #2296)(Judd, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
September 20, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Serving Standing Order Regarding Newly Assigned Cases filed by Defendants Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Jeffrey Chandler, Philip Chandler, Chandler Trust No 1, Chandler Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No 2, Earl E Crowe Trust No 2, Garland Foundation Trust No 2, Roger Goodan, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Gwendolyn Garland Babcock)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Hillary Duque Garland)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For William M Garland III)), Marian Otis Chandler Trust No 2, May C Goodan Tust No 2, Patricia Crowe Warren Residuary Trust No 2, Ruth C Von Platen Trust No 2, William Stinehart, Jr. (Feuer, Joel) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
September 20, 2011 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Notice of Removal,,,, #1 filed by Defendants Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Jeffrey Chandler, Philip Chandler, Chandler Trust No 1, Chandler Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No 2, Earl E Crowe Trust No 2, Garland Foundation Trust No 2, Roger Goodan, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Gwendolyn Garland Babcock)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Hillary Duque Garland)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For William M Garland III)), Marian Otis Chandler Trust No 2, May C Goodan Tust No 2, Patricia Crowe Warren Residuary Trust No 2, Ruth C Von Platen Trust No 2, William Stinehart, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Extension of Time for "Chandler Defendants" to Respont to Complaint)(Feuer, Joel) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding Newly Assigned Cases (See document for further details) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ir) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
September 15, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Jay Teitelbaum for Plaintiffs William A Niese, et al. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
September 14, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed.(esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
September 14, 2011 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants Chandler Trust No 1, Chandler Trust No 2, et al [SEE DOCUMENT FOR MORE] (esa) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]
September 14, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA Los Angeles County, case number BC462791 with CONFORMED copy of complaint. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, discovery to Magistrate Judge Paul L Abrams; (Filing fee $ 350 PAID ); filed by defendants Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Jeffrey Chandler, Philip Chandler, Chandler Trust No 1, Chandler Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2, Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No 2, Earl E Crowe Trust No 2, Garland Foundation Trust No 2, Roger Goodan, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins, HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins, Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Gwendolyn Garland Babcock)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For Hillary Duque Garland)), Helen Garland Trust No 2((For William M Garland III)), Marian Otis Chandler Trust No 2, May C Goodan Tust No 2, Patricia Crowe Warren Residuary Trust No 2, Ruth C Von Platen Trust No 2, William Stinehart, Jr.(esa) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 1/30/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William A Niese et al v. Chandler Trust No 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prism Partners I, L.P.
Represented By: Jahan P. Raissi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prism Partners III Leveraged, L.P.
Represented By: Jahan P. Raissi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prism Partners II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl V Dichek
Represented By: Geoffrey Paul Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Nova Scotia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Enterprise Investment Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Rowe Price Group Inc
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler Trust No 1
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Verdusco as trustee U/A Dtd. Francesca J. Verdusco Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EB Russell 1000 Value Stock-EB DV Large Cap Value Stock Index
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weintraub Capital Management, L.P.
Represented By: Jahan P. Raissi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residuary Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May C Goodan Tust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stinehart, Jr
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwab Fundamental US LG CO (2MB1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia H Yeomans Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research Affiliates Fundamental Index LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco City & County Employees' Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weintraub Capital Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard and Carol Askin Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MB Financial Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max S Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eureka Options LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Employee's Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Edison, NDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prism Partners II Offshore Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J Bell Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Zlatchin Profit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wedbush Securities Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Russell Shattuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Trader Pro LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Company-P&G Qual CPUC NDT Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Leichenger Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RWB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sempra Energy Pension Mstr Trst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water And Power Employees Ret
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALPERS
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Represented By: Marie G Quashnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Represented By: Walter Raymond Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 2000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund (2M37)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Goodan
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Crowe Warren Residuary Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosenberg Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette B Brumbaugh Ttee UA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Gbl Investors NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sempra Energy Pension Master Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth C Von Platen Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard F Hill Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of CA Regents
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Represented By: Marie G Quashnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Moore Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PG and E Qual Cpuc Ndt Partnership
Represented By: Stephen Leonard Ratner
Represented By: David Steve Mordkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Osher 2006 Charitable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glass Lewis and Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prism Partners III Leverage LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucile M Dunn Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janna L Gadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marian Otis Chandler Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland Foundation Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health West CHW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A Verdusco Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WG Trading Co LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab Inv Mgt Co
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviv Nevo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prism Partners IV Leveraged Offshore Fund
Represented By: Jahan P. Raissi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monumental Life Insurance Co
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: William Kennedy Dodds
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Whittier Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Hernandez, Jr
Represented By: Jason Thomas Manning
Represented By: Matthew R. Kipp
Represented By: Shauna R. Prewitt
Represented By: Donna L. McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prism Partners I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Spurgeon Family Limited
Represented By: David Charles Bohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris B Mahoney and Paul M Mahoney Ttees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Reinsurance (Bermuda) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving and Varda Rabin 1992 Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MC Investment Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Select Fund - Equity Index Portfolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellon Bank NA Emp Ben Pl
Represented By: Stephen Michael Ahron
Represented By: Stephen Leonard Ratner
Represented By: Michael Allen Firestein
Represented By: David Steve Mordkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund (2M40)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will K Weinstein Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl E Crowe Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Chandler
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Ironworkers Field
Represented By: Stuart Libicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Re Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert G Lau Profit Sharing Qrp Participation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Public Employee Retirement System
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Represented By: Marie G Quashnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re Camden Asset Mgmt LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Financial Group Inc
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Group Inc
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: William Kennedy Dodds
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prism Partners Offshore Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard And Barbro Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camilla Chandler Family Foundation
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claretian Missionaries Western Province Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Cnty Emp Ret System
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Osher Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Trust Company
Represented By: Stephen Michael Ahron
Represented By: Stephen Leonard Ratner
Represented By: David Steve Mordkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellsouth Corp Non-Representable Health Care Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reinhold and Shelley Weege Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean F Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Dichek Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Fay Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Edison Nuclear Facilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Mudd College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Fdn Hlth Plans Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants' Executive Committee
Represented By: David Charles Bohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M Mahoney Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford University LCV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vanguard Group Inc
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Represented By: Stuart Todd Steinberg
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Chandler
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Edison Company Nuclear Facilities Qualified CPUC Decommissioning Master Trust
Represented By: Thomas Richard Slome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Woods and L Mitchell Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Dept. Of Water And Power Employee RET-T Rowe Price LG VAL - Disability & Death Benefit Insurance Plan
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Garland Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No 2
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwab 1000 Index Fund (2M25)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D Friedman Ttee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verna R Harrah Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B4301 First Republic Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutler Group LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund (2M32)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Bank of California NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary A Schneider
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Valenti
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann E Dilworth
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward E Johnson
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D Wiegand
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald J Alcantar
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Weinstein
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred A Abatemarco
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin P Levin
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne K Falk
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norene Zapanta
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria King
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary A Wild
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G Magnuson
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E Barwick
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen G Peterson
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia G Campbell
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul H Egan
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert J Vida
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Holton
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Murphy
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen G McGuinness
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra A Gastler
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E Howe
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Fox
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Waller
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald F Wright
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T Nash
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott W Kabak
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T Grant
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome S Rubin
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis A Shirley
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth F Redmond
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark H Willes
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S Toedtman
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F Brandt
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J Marro
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald H Forst
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lobdell
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence M Higby
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan K Klutnick
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S Keating Rhoads
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Kuekes
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Wallace
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance I Furukawa
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Ibarguen
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delynn T Gutiry
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly McCleary LaFrance
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J Zakarian
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Halajian
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth G Davis
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D Crawford
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C McKeon
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan P Bell
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S Barrett
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon M Bowen
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George J Cotliar
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan L Brauer
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F Thomas
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Isinger
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Sann
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L Isenberg
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Halle
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F Erburu
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S Alfano
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H Norris
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W Stanton
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Brennan
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Wolinsky
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Udovic
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte H Hall
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Laventhol
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Forgione
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Marilyn Lee Schneider
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Scally
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Esgro
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T O Sullivan
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard T Schlosberg, III
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry W Wangberg
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger H Molvar
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L Bowlin
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Selzer
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al.
Represented By: James S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C Shelby Coffey, III
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Willard Colston
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark H Kurtich
Represented By: Jay Teitelbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey M Judd