Corr v. KMS Dublin LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Corr
Defendant: Skadden, Arps Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, KMS Dublin LLC, 281 Broadway Holdings LLC and KMS Tribeca LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00816
Filed: February 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Katherine B Forrest
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) 281 Broadway Holdings LLC, KMS Dublin LLC, KMS Tribeca LLC, Skadden, Arps Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP. Document filed by James Corr. (Jaskowiak, Adam)
June 19, 2012 Filing 7 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B Forrest from Adam Jaskowiak dated 6/14/2012 re: Request to adjourn the 6/26/2012 initial pretrial conference. ENDORSEMENT: The Initial Pretrial Conference is adjoruned to 7/27/2012 at 10:00 am and defendant Skadden's time to move or answer is extended to 7/17/2012. KMS Dublin LLC answer due 7/17/2012; KMS Tribeca LLC answer due 7/17/2012; Skadden, Arps Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP answer due 7/17/2012. (Motions due by 7/17/2012. Initial Conference reset for 7/27/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/19/2012) (cd)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER, 281 Broadway Holdings LLC answer due 7/20/2012. So Ordered. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered to respond: Plaintiff: why did it take so long to serve? No further extensions. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/19/2012) (cd)
May 29, 2012 Filing 5 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Adam Jaskowiak dated 5/24/2012 re: Counsel respectfully request an adjournment of the initial pretrial conference for at least one month so as to provide an adequate opportunity for consummation of the settlement or the appearance of the defendants in this action. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to 6/26/12 at 10:30 a.m. ( Initial Conference set for 6/26/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/29/2012) (jfe)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference in this action, currently scheduled for May 25, 2012 at 3:00, is hereby adjourned to May 29, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. ( Initial Conference set for 5/29/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/2/2012) (pl)
April 13, 2012 Filing 3 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Adam Jaskowiak dated 4/11/2012 re: Counsel for the plaintiff requests an adjournment of the Initial Pretrial Conference. ENDORSEMENT: The Initial Pretrial Conference is adjourned to May 25, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. (Initial Conference set for 5/25/2012 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/13/2012) (ft)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/18/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/28/2012) (pl)
February 1, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
February 1, 2012 Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (ama)
February 1, 2012 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 281 Broadway Holdings LLC, KMS Dublin LLC, KMS Tribeca LLC, Skadden, Arps Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP. (ama)
February 1, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 281 Broadway Holdings LLC, KMS Dublin LLC, KMS Tribeca LLC, Skadden, Arps Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 8522)Document filed by James Corr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 Complaint Part 3)(ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corr v. KMS Dublin LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skadden, Arps Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMS Dublin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 281 Broadway Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMS Tribeca LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Corr
Represented By: Allan H. Carlin
Represented By: Adam Michael Jaskowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?